Unknown
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:05-cv-02042
District Judge Charles R. Breyer, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 3, 2017 at 6:45 AM DT (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Mario Saldana-Harlow, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mario Saldana-Harlow

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/12/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBERT STANLEY GREEN +1 415 477 6700 +1 415 477 6710 flnd.uscourts@classcounsel.com
No Logo Prena Smajlaj, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Green Welling, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/12/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBERT STANLEY GREEN +1 415 477 6700 +1 415 477 6710 flnd.uscourts@classcounsel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/02/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick J. Coughlin +1 415 288 4545 +1 415 288 4534 PatC@milberg.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Murray Frank & Sailer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric J. Belfi +1 212 682 1818 +1 212 682 1892 ebelfi@murrayfrank.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Phillip Murray +1 212 682 1818 +1 212 682 1892 bmurray@murrayfrank.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/02/2005, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Shannon Lerach +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 general_efile@csgrr.com
TERMINATED: 06/02/2005, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Darren Jay Robbins +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 e_file_sd@csgrr.com
v.
No Logo Antonio Canova, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Norman J. Blears +1 415 326 7600
TERMINATED: 04/13/2006, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nina F. Locker +65493930 654 493 9300

Toggle Switch Represented by Heller Ehrman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/30/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander M.R. Lyon +1 650 324 7000 +1 650 324 0638 alexander.lyon@hellerehrman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan & Hartson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert B. Buehler , +1 212 918 3000 +1 212 918 3100 rbuehler@hhlaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robin Eve Wechkin +1 650 463 4000 +1 650 463 4199 rwechkin@hhlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/13/2006, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Guggenheim +1 415 493 3900 sguggenheim@wsgr.com
TERMINATED: 04/13/2006, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Caz Hashemi +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 CHASHEMI@WSGR.COM
TERMINATED: 04/13/2006, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Andrew McCarthy +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 493 6811 dmccarthy@wsgr.com
Brocade Communications Systems, Inc. Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/15/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nina F. Locker +65493930 654 493 9300

Represented by Cooley LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Securities and Exchange Commission

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/15/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cameron Powers Hoffman +1 415 705 2455 HoffmanC@sec.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/15/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Crystal Mothershead Gaudette +1 650 493 9300 cgaudette@wsgr.com
TERMINATED: 10/15/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Guggenheim +1 415 493 3900 sguggenheim@wsgr.com
TERMINATED: 10/15/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Caz Hashemi +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 CHASHEMI@WSGR.COM
TERMINATED: 10/15/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher R. Howald +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 chowald@wsgr.com
TERMINATED: 10/15/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Andrew McCarthy +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 493 6811 dmccarthy@wsgr.com
TERMINATED: 10/15/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Thomas Oakes +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 493 6811 moakes@wsgr.com
TERMINATED: 10/15/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle Jami Shapiro +1 212 497 7720 +1 212 999 5899 mshapiro@wsgr.com
No Logo Christopher B Paisley, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Securities and Exchange Commission

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cameron Powers Hoffman +1 415 705 2455 HoffmanC@sec.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher R. Howald +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 chowald@wsgr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Thomas Oakes +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 493 6811 moakes@wsgr.com
No Logo Gregory L. Reyes, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Marmaro

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooley LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Devereaux +1 650 843 5000 +1 650 857 0663 devereauxsd@cooley.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen Howard Goodhart +1 650 843 5000 +1 650 857 0663 kgoodhart@cooley.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Cassidy Neal +1 415 693 2000 +1 650 849 7400 sneal@cooley.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neil J Stephens +1 415 693 2000 +1 650 857 0663 nstephens@cooley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Garrett J. Waltzer +1 650 470 4540 +1 650 470 4570 gwaltzer@skadden.com
KPMG LLP KPMG LLP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Geoffrey M. Ezgar +1 415 772 1292 +1 415 772 7400 gezgar@sidley.com
No Logo Larry W. Sonsini, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cravath, Swaine & Moore, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Evan Robert Chesler +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 echesler@cravath.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karl C. Huth +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael A Paskin +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 mpaskin@cravath.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Slifkin +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 dslifkin@cravath.com

Represented by Taylor & Company Law Offices, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Securities and Exchange Commission

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/15/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cameron Powers Hoffman +1 415 705 2455 HoffmanC@sec.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/15/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Crystal Mothershead Gaudette +1 650 493 9300 cgaudette@wsgr.com
TERMINATED: 10/15/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Guggenheim +1 415 493 3900 sguggenheim@wsgr.com
TERMINATED: 10/15/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher R. Howald +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 chowald@wsgr.com
TERMINATED: 10/15/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Thomas Oakes +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 493 6811 moakes@wsgr.com
TERMINATED: 10/15/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle Jami Shapiro +1 212 497 7720 +1 212 999 5899 mshapiro@wsgr.com
No Logo Mark Leslie, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Farella Braun & Martel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jessica Koren Nall +1 415 954 4400 +1 415 954 4480 jnall@fbm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Securities and Exchange Commission

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cameron Powers Hoffman +1 415 705 2455 HoffmanC@sec.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher R. Howald +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 chowald@wsgr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Thomas Oakes +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 493 6811 moakes@wsgr.com
No Logo Michael Byrd, Defendant

Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

No Logo Neal Dempsey, Defendant

Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Securities and Exchange Commission

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/15/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cameron Powers Hoffman +1 415 705 2455 HoffmanC@sec.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/15/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Crystal Mothershead Gaudette +1 650 493 9300 cgaudette@wsgr.com
TERMINATED: 10/15/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Guggenheim +1 415 493 3900 sguggenheim@wsgr.com
TERMINATED: 10/15/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher R. Howald +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 chowald@wsgr.com
TERMINATED: 10/15/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Thomas Oakes +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 493 6811 moakes@wsgr.com
TERMINATED: 10/15/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle Jami Shapiro +1 212 497 7720 +1 212 999 5899 mshapiro@wsgr.com
No Logo Nicholas G. Moore, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Securities and Exchange Commission

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cameron Powers Hoffman +1 415 705 2455 HoffmanC@sec.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher R. Howald +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 chowald@wsgr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Thomas Oakes +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 493 6811 moakes@wsgr.com
No Logo Seth D. Neiman, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Securities and Exchange Commission

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/15/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cameron Powers Hoffman +1 415 705 2455 HoffmanC@sec.gov

Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/15/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Crystal Mothershead Gaudette +1 650 493 9300 cgaudette@wsgr.com
TERMINATED: 10/15/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Guggenheim +1 415 493 3900 sguggenheim@wsgr.com
TERMINATED: 10/15/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher R. Howald +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 chowald@wsgr.com
TERMINATED: 10/15/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Thomas Oakes +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 493 6811 moakes@wsgr.com
TERMINATED: 10/15/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle Jami Shapiro +1 212 497 7720 +1 212 999 5899 mshapiro@wsgr.com
No Logo Frank Petruno, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by burkelaw.us Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy J. Burke +1 781 380 0770 +1 781 848 0330 tim@burkelaw.us
No Logo Gordon A. Meccay, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by burkelaw.us Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy J. Burke +1 781 380 0770 +1 781 848 0330 tim@burkelaw.us
No Logo Hai-Ning Huang, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by burkelaw.us Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy J. Burke +1 781 380 0770 +1 781 848 0330 tim@burkelaw.us
No Logo Way-Ling Hwang, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by burkelaw.us Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy J. Burke +1 781 380 0770 +1 781 848 0330 tim@burkelaw.us
No Logo Andrew E. Roth, Third Party Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Schubert Jonckheer & Kolbe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Willem Frans Jonckheer +1 415 788 4220 +1 415 788 0161 wjonckheer@schubert-reed.com
No Logo Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System, Movant

Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Keil & Goodson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John C. Goodson +1 870 772 4113 +1 870 773 2967 jcgoodson@kglawfirm.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED D. Matt Keil +1 870 772 4113 +1 870 773 2967 mkeil@kglawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of George L. McWilliams, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Andrew Adams +1 903 334 7000 +1 903 334 7007 richard.adams@pattonroberts.com
TERMINATED: 07/18/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George L. McWilliams +1 903 277 0098 +1 903 334 7007 gmcwilliams@pattonroberts.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leisa B. Pearlman +1 903 334 7000 +1 903 334 7007 lpearlman@pattonroberts.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shivali Sharma ssharma@pattonroberts.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nix Patterson & Roach LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey John Angelovich +1 512 328 5333 +1 512 328 5335 jangelovich@npraustin.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bradley Earl Beckworth +1 903 645 7333 +1 903 645 4415 bbeckworth@nixlawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan Whatley +1 903 645 7333 +1 903 645 4415 susanwhatley@nixlawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Patton Roberts McWilliams & Capshaw, L.L.P.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James C Wyly +1 903 334 7000 +1 903 334 7007 jwyly@pattonroberts.com
No Logo City of Hialeah Employees' Retirement System, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cotchett Pitre & McCarthy, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kelly L Sommerfeld +1 650 697 6000 +1 650 697 0577 ksommerfeld@cpsmlaw.com
No Logo Gilberto Felix, Movant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gilberto Felix
No Logo Gino Romano, Movant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gino Romano
No Logo Giulio Cessario, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Tiwari, Ritesh

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael David Braun +1 310 442 7755 +1 310 442 7756 service@braunlawgroup.com
No Logo Huang Group, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by burkelaw.us Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy J. Burke +1 781 380 0770 +1 781 848 0330 tim@burkelaw.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Stull, Stull & Brody

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrice Lyn Bishop +1 310 209 2468 +1 310 209 2087 pbishop@ssbla.com
No Logo Intrepid Capital Management, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sandy A Liebhard +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 liebhard@bernlieb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Uri Seth Ottensoser +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 ottensoser@bernlieb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph R. Seidman +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 seidman@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Egleston Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory Michael Egleston +1 212 683 3400 +1 212 683 3402 greg.egleston@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Glancy Binkow & Goldberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Arthur Binkow +1 310 201 9150 +1 310 201 9160 info@glancylaw.com
No Logo John W Geary, III, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Scott + Scott, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Arthur L. Shingler, III +1 619 233 4565 +1 619 233 0508 ashingler@scott-scott.com
No Logo Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirements System, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Green Welling, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/12/2008, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBERT STANLEY GREEN +1 415 477 6700 +1 415 477 6710 flnd.uscourts@classcounsel.com

Represented by Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

No Logo Steven Eisenfrats, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Betsy Carol Manifold +1 619 239 4599 manifold@whafh.com
No Logo Suzanne Patrick, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Betsy Carol Manifold +1 619 239 4599 manifold@whafh.com
No Logo Erie County PA Employees Retirement System, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ian David Berg +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 iberg@sbtklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Anthony Kehoe +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 jkehoe@btkmc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nix Patterson & Roach LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan Whatley +1 903 645 7333 +1 903 645 4415 susanwhatley@nixlawfirm.com
KPMG LLP KPMG LLP, Third Party Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Geoffrey M. Ezgar +1 415 772 1292 +1 415 772 7400 gezgar@sidley.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a)
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (530) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 530 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
Transcript of Proceedings held on 8-26-2005, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, Telephone number (415) 431-1477. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/29/2013. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 2/28/2013) (Entered: 02/28/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 529 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
    Mail sent to Clarence Brown returned as undeliverable re 527 Order on Motion to Intervene. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2010) (Entered: 10/13/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 528 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: None
      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 527 Order on Motion to Intervene (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2010) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 527 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 525 Motion to Intervene (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2010) (Entered: 09/29/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 526 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: None
          Memorandum in Opposition to Purported Motion to Intervene filed byArkansas Public Employee Retirement System, Erie County PA Employees Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Whatley, Susan) (Filed on 9/27/2010) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 525 Filed: 8/30/2010, Entered: None
            MOTION to Enforce Consent Decree & MOTION to Intervene as Plaintiffs Under Fed.R.Civ.P. Rule 24(A), 24(B) filed by Patrick J. Simpson, Richard Galietti, Musio Alvarado, Billy Driggers, RIches Jonthan Lee, Jimmy O'Neal Brown, Larry Morris, Ralph Rogers, Clarence Brown, Isong Akpan. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2010) (Entered: 09/08/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 524 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: None
              Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 8/6/2010 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 8/6/2010) re 514 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds filed by Erie County PA Employees Retirement System, Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (Court Reporter Joan Columbini.) (be, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/6/2010) (Entered: 08/06/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 523 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 514 Motion for Disbursement of Funds (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2010) (Entered: 08/06/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 522 Filed: 8/5/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER to appear telephonically regarding motion. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/5/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2010) (Entered: 08/05/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 521 Filed: 8/4/2010, Entered: None
                    Proposed Order And Request To Appear Telephonically Regarding Motion For Distribution of The Net Settlement Fund by KPMG, L.L.P. (Martin, Robert) (Filed on 8/4/2010) (Entered: 08/04/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 520 Filed: 8/4/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER for telephonic appearance. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/3/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2010) (Entered: 08/04/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 519 Filed: 8/3/2010, Entered: None
                        Proposed Order FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE RE MOTION FOR DISTRIBUTION OF THE NET SETTLEMENT FUND by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Dwyer, John) (Filed on 8/3/2010) (Entered: 08/03/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 518 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 517 Motion for a ruling in a telephonic hearing (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2010) (Entered: 07/26/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 517 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None
                            MOTION for a Ruling Without a Hearing or, in the Alternative, a Telephonic Hearing on 514 Class Representatives' Motion for Distribution of the Net Settlement Fund filed by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System, Erie County PA Employees Retirement System. Motion Hearing set for 8/6/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Whatley, Susan) (Filed on 7/6/2010) Modified on 7/7/2010 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 516 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: None
                              Declaration of Bradley E. Beckworth in Support of 514 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds filed byArkansas Public Employee Retirement System, Erie County PA Employees Retirement System. (Related document(s) 514 ) (Whatley, Susan) (Filed on 6/29/2010) (Entered: 06/29/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 515 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: None
                                AFFIDAVIT of Aaron Waugh re 514 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds [AFFIDAVIT of Aaron Waugh] by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System, Erie County PA Employees Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Whatley, Susan) (Filed on 6/29/2010) Modified on 6/30/2010 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/29/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 514 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: None
                                  MOTION for Disbursement of Funds filed by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System, Erie County PA Employees Retirement System. Motion Hearing set for 8/6/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Whatley, Susan) (Filed on 6/29/2010) (Entered: 06/29/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Blank 513 Filed: 10/16/2009, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc. of Plaintiffs' Request to Dismiss State Appeal (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Dunning, Angela) (Filed on 10/16/2009) (Entered: 10/16/2009)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 512 Filed: 10/7/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      Transcript of Proceedings held on 08/24/07, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sahar McVickar, CSR, RPR, Telephone number (415) 626-6060/sahar_mcvickar@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/4/2010. (McVickar, Sahar) (Filed on 10/7/2009) (Entered: 10/07/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 511 Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: None
                                        Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 10/2/2009 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 9/2/2009) re 502 MOTION to Enforce Judgment Defendant Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Enforce Class Action Settlement and Final Order and Judgment filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Court Reporter Sarah Goekler.) (be, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/2/2009) (Entered: 10/05/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 510 Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on October 5, 2009. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2009) (Entered: 10/05/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 509 Filed: 9/18/2009, Entered: None
                                            Declaration of Angela L. Dunning in Support of 508 Reply to Response to Motion, Motion to Enforce Class Action Settlement and Final Order and Judgment filed byBrocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) 508 ) (Dunning, Angela) (Filed on 9/18/2009) (Entered: 09/18/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Blank 508 Filed: 9/18/2009, Entered: None
                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re 502 MOTION to Enforce Judgment Defendant Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Enforce Class Action Settlement and Final Order and Judgment filed byBrocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Dunning, Angela) (Filed on 9/18/2009) (Entered: 09/18/2009)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 507 Filed: 9/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                Declaration of Timothy J. Burke in Support of 506 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byHai-Ning Huang, Way-Ling Hwang, Gordon A. Meccay, Frank Petruno. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Related document(s) 506 ) (Burke, Timothy) (Filed on 9/11/2009) (Entered: 09/11/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Blank 506 Filed: 9/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                  Memorandum in Opposition re 502 MOTION to Enforce Judgment Defendant Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Enforce Class Action Settlement and Final Order and Judgment filed byHai-Ning Huang, Way-Ling Hwang, Frank Petruno, Gordon A. Meccay. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Burke, Timothy) (Filed on 9/11/2009) (Entered: 09/11/2009)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 505 Filed: 8/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                    Proposed Order re 502 MOTION to Enforce Judgment Defendant Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Enforce Class Action Settlement and Final Order and Judgment, 503 Request for Judicial Notice, 504 Declaration in Support,,, by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Dwyer, John) (Filed on 8/17/2009) (Entered: 08/17/2009)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 504 Filed: 8/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                      Declaration of Angela L. Dunning in Support of 502 MOTION to Enforce Judgment Defendant Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Enforce Class Action Settlement and Final Order and Judgment, 503 Request for Judicial Notice, filed byBrocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit Exhibit 20)(Related document(s) 502 , 503 ) (Dwyer, John) (Filed on 8/17/2009) (Entered: 08/17/2009)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 503 Filed: 8/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                        Request for Judicial Notice re 502 MOTION to Enforce Judgment Defendant Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Enforce Class Action Settlement and Final Order and Judgment filed byBrocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Related document(s) 502 ) (Dwyer, John) (Filed on 8/17/2009) (Entered: 08/17/2009)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Blank 502 Filed: 8/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                          MOTION to Enforce Judgment Defendant Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Enforce Class Action Settlement and Final Order and Judgment filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/2/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Dwyer, John) (Filed on 8/17/2009) (Entered: 08/17/2009)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 501 Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            Transcript of Proceedings held on March 13, 2009, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Sullivan, CSR, CRR, Telephone number 415-794-6659. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/23/2009. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 4/27/2009) (Entered: 04/27/2009)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 500 Filed: 4/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                              Letter from Charles Wahl. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2009) (Entered: 04/13/2009)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 499 Filed: 3/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE of Change of Address by Norman J. Blears NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ADDRESS (Blears, Norman) (Filed on 3/31/2009) (Entered: 03/31/2009)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 498 Filed: 2/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Address by Michael David Braun (Braun, Michael) (Filed on 2/26/2009) (Entered: 02/26/2009)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 497 Filed: 1/29/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    Transcript of Proceedings held on 1-23-09, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Wyatt, Telephone number 925-212-5224. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/27/2009. (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2009) (Entered: 01/29/2009)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Blank 496 Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER by Judge Breyer granting 485 Motion for Settlement; granting 486 Motion for Attorney Fees (Attachments: # 1 Final Order/Judgment, # 2 Appendix exclusions) (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2009) (Entered: 01/26/2009)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 495 Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                        Proposed Order Modified Proposed Final Order and Judgment by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Whatley, Susan) (Filed on 1/26/2009) (Entered: 01/26/2009)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 494 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                          Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 1/23/2009 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 1/23/2009) re 486 MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice of Motion, Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Class Counsel's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses filed by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System, 485 MOTION for Settlement Class Representatives' Notice of Motion, Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities for (1) Final Approval of the Settlements and (2) Final Approval of the Proposed Plan of Allocation MOTION for Settlement Class Representatives' Notice of Motion, Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities for (1) Final Approval of the Settlements and (2) Final Approval of the Proposed Plan of Allocation filed by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.) (be, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/23/2009) (Entered: 01/26/2009)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 493 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                            Letter from Bradley E. Beckworth. (Whatley, Susan) (Filed on 1/23/2009) (Entered: 01/23/2009)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 492 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mark Leslie re 491 Notice (Other) (Nall, Jessica) (Filed on 1/16/2009) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 491 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE by Mark Leslie re 481 Joinder NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF OBJECTION TO PROPOSED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT (Nall, Jessica) (Filed on 1/16/2009) Modified on 1/20/2009 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 490 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                  NOTICE by Michael Byrd Notice of Withdrawal of 480 Objection to Proposed Settlement Agreement (Cohen, Josh) (Filed on 1/16/2009) Modified on 1/20/2009 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 489 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                    STIPULATION re 471 Stipulation Modified Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (Whatley, Susan) (Filed on 1/16/2009) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 488 Filed: 1/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                      Declaration of Jeffrey J. Angelovich in Support of 486 MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice of Motion, Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Class Counsel's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses, 485 MOTION for Settlement Class Representatives' Notice of Motion, Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities for (1) Final Approval of the Settlements and (2) Final Approval of the Proposed Plan of Allocation MOTION for Settlement Class Representatives' Notice of Motion, Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities for (1) Final Approval of the Settlements and (2) Final Approval of the Proposed Plan of Allocation filed byArkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Related document(s) 486 , 485 ) (Whatley, Susan) (Filed on 1/15/2009) (Entered: 01/15/2009)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 487 Filed: 1/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                        Declaration of Aaron Waugh in Support of 486 MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice of Motion, Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Class Counsel's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses, 485 MOTION for Settlement Class Representatives' Notice of Motion, Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities for (1) Final Approval of the Settlements and (2) Final Approval of the Proposed Plan of Allocation MOTION for Settlement Class Representatives' Notice of Motion, Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities for (1) Final Approval of the Settlements and (2) Final Approval of the Proposed Plan of Allocation filed byArkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Related document(s) 486 , 485 ) (Whatley, Susan) (Filed on 1/15/2009) (Entered: 01/15/2009)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 486 Filed: 1/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                          MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice of Motion, Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Class Counsel's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses filed by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System. Motion Hearing set for 1/23/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Whatley, Susan) (Filed on 1/15/2009) (Entered: 01/15/2009)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Blank 485 Filed: 1/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                            MOTION for Settlement Class Representatives' Notice of Motion, Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities for (1) Final Approval of the Settlements and (2) Final Approval of the Proposed Plan of Allocation filed by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System. Motion Hearing set for 1/23/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Whatley, Susan) (Filed on 1/15/2009) (Entered: 01/15/2009)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 484 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mark Leslie re 483 Errata CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE TO PARTIES NOT SERVED ELECTRONICALLY (Nall, Jessica) (Filed on 1/14/2009) (Entered: 01/14/2009)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 483 Filed: 1/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                ERRATA re 481 Joinder TO MARK LESLIE'S JOINDER IN MICHAEL BYRD'S OBJECTION TO PROPOSED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT by Mark Leslie. (Nall, Jessica) (Filed on 1/13/2009) (Entered: 01/13/2009)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 482 Filed: 1/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mark Leslie re 481 Joinder (Nall, Jessica) (Filed on 1/13/2009) (Entered: 01/13/2009)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 481 Filed: 1/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Joinder re 480 Objection to Proposed Settlement Agreement by Mark Leslie. (Nall, Jessica) (Filed on 1/12/2009) (Entered: 01/12/2009)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 480 Filed: 1/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                      OBJECTIONS to Proposed Settlement Agreement by Michael Byrd. (Cohen, Josh) (Filed on 1/9/2009) (Entered: 01/09/2009)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 479 Filed: 1/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Sue Weber by Erie County PA Employees Retirement System. (Whatley, Susan) (Filed on 1/7/2009) (Entered: 01/07/2009)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 478 Filed: 1/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Layn Phillips and Charles Renfrew by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (Whatley, Susan) (Filed on 1/5/2009) (Entered: 01/05/2009)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 477 Filed: 1/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Gail Stone by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (Whatley, Susan) (Filed on 1/5/2009) (Entered: 01/05/2009)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 476 Filed: 12/1/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              Transcript of Proceedings held on November 14, 2008, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, Telephone number 415-255-6842. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/26/2009. (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 12/1/2008) (Entered: 12/01/2008)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 475 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                ORDER granting 472 Motion for preliminary approval (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2008) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 474 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  Letter from Brad Beckworth to Judge Breyer re: Escrow Agreement. (Whatley, Susan) (Filed on 11/17/2008) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 473 Filed: 11/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 11/14/2008 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 11/14/2008) re 472 MOTION re 471 Stipulation, 470 Stipulation, Class Representatives' Notice of Motion and Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement MOTION re 471 Stipulation, 470 Stipulation, Class Representatives' Notice of Motion and Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement filed by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System. Fairness Hearing set for 1/23/2009 10:00 AM. (Court Reporter Joan Columbini.) (be, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/14/2008) (Entered: 11/14/2008)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 472 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      MOTION re 471 Stipulation, 470 Stipulation, Class Representatives' Notice of Motion and Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement filed by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System. Motion Hearing set for 11/14/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Whatley, Susan) (Filed on 10/24/2008) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 471 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        STIPULATION and Agreement of Settlement by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit A Tab 1, # 3 Exhibit A Tab 2, # 4 Exhibit A Tab 3, # 5 Exhibit B)(Whatley, Susan) (Filed on 10/24/2008) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 470 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          STIPULATION and Agreement of Settlement Among Class Representatives and KPMG LLP by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit A Tab 1, # 3 Exhibit A Tab 2, # 4 Exhibit A Tab 3, # 5 Exhibit B)(Whatley, Susan) (Filed on 10/24/2008) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 469 Filed: 10/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc. Notice of Disassociation of Counsel (Dwyer, John) (Filed on 10/1/2008) (Entered: 10/01/2008)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 468 Filed: 9/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Alexander M.R. Lyon (Lyon, Alexander) (Filed on 9/30/2008) (Entered: 09/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 467 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Mail sent to Gino Romano returned as undeliverable re 465 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, Order on Motion to Intervene. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2008) (Entered: 09/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 466 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Mario Saldana-Harlow OF WITHDRAWAL OF GREEN WELLING LLP AS COUNSEL FOR MARIO SALDANA-HARLOW (Green, Robert) (Filed on 9/12/2008) (Entered: 09/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 465 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Breyer denying 464 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 464 Motion to Intervene (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2008) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/27/2008: # 1 Certificate of Service) (be, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 464 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Reconsideration, MOTION to Intervene filed by Gilberto Felix, Gino Romano. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2008) (Entered: 08/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 463 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        Transcript of Proceedings held on August 21, 2008, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter/Transcriber Belle Ball, CSR, RMR, CRR, e-mail address belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov, Telephone number (415)373-2529. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/17/2008. (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 8/22/2008) (Entered: 08/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 462 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER RELATING CASEC-08-2029JSW to C-05-2233CRB adn C-05-2042CRB, the Barbour action is not consolidated into C-05-2233CRB. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/27/08. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2008) (Entered: 05/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 461 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 460 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (N Y Altman) (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2008) (Entered: 05/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 460 Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Nicole Y. Altman) ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611019333.) filed by Larry W. Sonsini. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2008) (Entered: 05/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 459 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Ramiz I. Rafeedie (Rafeedie, Ramiz) (Filed on 5/19/2008) (Entered: 05/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 458 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Breyer granting 426 Motion for Summary Judgment; finding as moot 427 Motion to Strike (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2008) (Entered: 05/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 457 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    Transcript of Proceedings held on 5/9/08, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter/Transcriber Belle Ball. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2008) (Entered: 05/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 456 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 426 MOTION for Summary Judgment Class Representatives' Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Course and Scope Class Representatives' Response to Defendant Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.'s Request to Consider the Declaration of Gordon C. Atkinson in Support of Brocade's Opposition to Class Representatives' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Course and Scope filed byArkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (Fong, Linda) (Filed on 5/12/2008) (Entered: 05/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 455 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Request for Judicial Notice re 454 Declaration in Opposition to Consider Declaration filed byBrocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Related document(s) 454 ) (Atkinson, Gordon) (Filed on 5/12/2008) (Entered: 05/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 454 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Gordon C. Atkinson in Opposition to 426 Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Course and Scope filed byBrocade Communications Systems, Inc. (Atkinson, Gordon) (Filed on 5/12/2008) Modified on 5/13/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 453 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 5/9/2008 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 5/9/2008) re 427 MOTION to Strike Class Representatives' Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike Brocade's RFA Responses and Deem Admitted filed by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System, 426 MOTION for Summary Judgment Class Representatives' Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Course and Scope filed by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (Court Reporter Belle Ball.) (be, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/9/2008) (Entered: 05/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 452 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 451 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Karl C. Huth) (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2008) (Entered: 04/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 451 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Karl C. Huth) ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611018539.) filed by Larry W. Sonsini. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2008) (Entered: 04/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 450 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System re 448 Declaration in Support, 449 Reply to Opposition, 447 Reply to Opposition, (Fong, Linda) (Filed on 4/25/2008) (Entered: 04/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 449 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Reply to Opposition OF 444 DEFENDANT BROCADE COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS, INC.S OPPOSITION TO CLASS REPRESENTATIVES MOTION TO STRIKE BROCADES RFA RESPONSES AND DEEM ADMITTED filed byArkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (Fong, Linda) (Filed on 4/25/2008) Modified on 4/28/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 448 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of SUSAN WHATLEY IN SUPPORT OF 447 CLASS REPRESENTATIVES REPLY TO DEFENDANT BROCADE COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS, INC.S OPPOSITION TO CLASS REPRESENTATIVES MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING COURSE AND SCOPE filed byArkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Fong, Linda) (Filed on 4/25/2008) Modified on 4/28/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 447 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Reply to Opposition re 442 DEFENDANT BROCADE COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS, INC.S OPPOSITION TO CLASS REPRESENTATIVES MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING COURSE AND SCOPE filed byArkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (Fong, Linda) (Filed on 4/25/2008) Modified on 4/28/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 446 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re 445 Stipulation, filed by Erie County PA Employees Retirement System, Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 445 Stipulation, 426 MOTION for Summary Judgment Class Representatives' Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Course and Scope, 427 MOTION to Strike Class Representatives' Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike Brocade's RFA Responses and Deem Admitted. Replies due by 4/25/2008.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/21/08. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2008) (Entered: 03/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 445 Filed: 3/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE PLAINTIFFS' TIME TO REPLY TO DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING COURSE AND SCOPE AND MOTION TO STRIKE BROCADE'S RFA RESPONSES AND DEEM ADMITTED by Erie County PA Employees Retirement System, Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (King, Laurence) (Filed on 3/20/2008) (Entered: 03/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 444 Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in Opposition Defendant Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.'s Opposition to 427 Motion to Strike Brocade's RFA Responses and Deem Admitted filed byBrocade Communications Systems, Inc. (Fondo, Grant) (Filed on 3/14/2008) Modified on 3/17/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 443 Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Benjamin D. Singerman in Support of 442 Memorandum in Opposition, Defendant Brocade's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment regarding Course and Scope and Defendant Brocade's Opposition to Motion to Strike Brocade's RFA Responses and Deem Admitted filed byBrocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit K - Part 1, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit K - Part 2, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Exhibit Q, # 19 Exhibit Exhibit R, # 20 Exhibit Exhibit S, # 21 Exhibit Exhibit T, # 22 Exhibit Exhibit U, # 23 Exhibit Exhibit V, # 24 Exhibit Exhibit W, # 25 Exhibit Exhibit X)(Related document(s) 442 ) (Dwyer, John) (Filed on 3/14/2008) (Entered: 03/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 442 Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in Opposition Defendant Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.'s Opposition to 426 Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment regarding Course and Scope filed byBrocade Communications Systems, Inc. (Dwyer, John) (Filed on 3/14/2008) Modified on 3/17/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 441 Filed: 3/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    First MOTION for Disclosure Neal Dempsey's Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.26(a)(1) filed by Neal Dempsey. (Bornstein, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/13/2008) (Entered: 03/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 440 Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER to continue re 439 Stipulation, filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., Set/Reset Deadlines as to 439 Stipulation, 426 MOTION for Summary Judgment Class Representatives' Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Course and Scope, 427 MOTION to Strike Class Representatives' Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike Brocade's RFA Responses and Deem Admitted. Motion Hearing set for 5/9/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Replies due by 3/21/2008. Responses due by 3/14/2008.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/7/08. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2008) (Entered: 03/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 439 Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Continue Hearing on 426 Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Course and Scope and 427 Motion to Strike Brocade's RFAS and Deem Admitted by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Dwyer, John) (Filed on 3/7/2008) Modified on 3/10/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting Rober B. Buehler 289 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2008) (Entered: 02/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 437 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Order re 289 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 3461100574.) by Antonio Canova. (Lyon, Alexander) (Filed on 2/28/2008) (Entered: 02/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 436 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re 435 Stipulation, filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 435 Stipulation, 426 MOTION for Summary Judgment Class Representatives' Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Course and Scope, 427 MOTION to Strike Class Representatives' Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike Brocade's RFA Responses and Deem Admitted :, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 435 Stipulation, 426 MOTION for Summary Judgment Class Representatives' Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Course and Scope, 427 MOTION to Strike Class Representatives' Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike Brocade's RFA Responses and Deem Admitted. Replies due by 3/14/2008. Motion Hearing set for 3/28/2008 10:00 AM. Responses due by 3/7/2008.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/11/08. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2008) (Entered: 02/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 435 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Continue Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Course and Scope and Motion to Strike Brocade's RFAs and Deem Admitted by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Santamaria, Jessica) (Filed on 2/1/2008) (Entered: 02/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 434 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Larry W. Sonsini Notice of Change of Firm Name (Taylor, Stephen) (Filed on 1/30/2008) (Entered: 01/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 1/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting Matt Keil 431 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2008) (Entered: 01/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 1/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting John C. Goodson 430 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2008) (Entered: 01/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Matt Keil) ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611014800.) filed by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2008) (Entered: 01/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (John C. Goodson) ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611014800.) filed by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2008) (Entered: 01/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 429 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System re 427 MOTION to Strike Class Representatives' Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike Brocade's RFA Responses and Deem Admitted, 426 MOTION for Summary Judgment Class Representatives' Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Course and Scope, 428 Declaration in Support,, (Fong, Linda) (Filed on 1/18/2008) (Entered: 01/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Bradley E. Beckworth in Support of 427 MOTION to Strike Class Representatives' Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike Brocade's RFA Responses and Deem Admitted, 426 MOTION for Summary Judgment Class Representatives' Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Course and Scope filed byArkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14)(Related document(s) 427 , 426 ) (Fong, Linda) (Filed on 1/18/2008) (Entered: 01/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Strike Class Representatives' Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike Brocade's RFA Responses and Deem Admitted filed by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System. Motion Hearing set for 2/29/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Fong, Linda) (Filed on 1/18/2008) (Entered: 01/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Summary Judgment Class Representatives' Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Course and Scope filed by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System. Motion Hearing set for 2/29/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Fong, Linda) (Filed on 1/18/2008) (Entered: 01/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 12/20/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER RELATING CASE C-07-5950Jl to C-05-2042CRB.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/19/07. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2007) (Entered: 12/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 12/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of ANGELA L. DUNNING in Support of 423 MOTION to Relate Case Notice and Administratrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed byBrocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Related document(s) 423 ) (Fondo, Grant) (Filed on 12/5/2007) (Entered: 12/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 12/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Relate Case Notice and Administratrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Fondo, Grant) (Filed on 12/5/2007) (Entered: 12/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 422 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting D Slifkin 417 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2007) (Entered: 12/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 421 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting M A Paskin 416 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2007) (Entered: 12/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 420 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc. re 419 Declaration in Support, 418 Notice (Other) (Fondo, Grant) (Filed on 12/3/2007) (Entered: 12/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Angela L. Dunning in Support of 418 Notice (Other) of Administrative Motion to Relate Cases filed byBrocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Related document(s) 418 ) (Fondo, Grant) (Filed on 12/3/2007) (Entered: 12/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 418 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc. and Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Fondo, Grant) (Filed on 12/3/2007) (Entered: 12/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 417 Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Daniel Slifkin) ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611012975.) filed by Larry W. Sonsini. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2007) (Entered: 11/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 416 Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Michael A. Paskin) ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611012974.) filed by Larry W. Sonsini. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2007) (Entered: 11/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Change of Address by Linda M. Fong (Fong, Linda) (Filed on 11/29/2007) (Entered: 11/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 414 Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Amended Complaint byLarry W. Sonsini. (Grant, Jessica) (Filed on 11/26/2007) (Entered: 11/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 413 Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of Interested Entities by Larry W. Sonsini (Grant, Jessica) (Filed on 11/26/2007) (Entered: 11/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 412 Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Evan R. Chesler as additional counsel for defendant Larry W. Sonsini (Chesler, Evan) (Filed on 11/26/2007) (Entered: 11/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 411 Filed: 11/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Seth D. Neiman re 410 Certificate of Interested Entities (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 11/7/2007) (Entered: 11/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410 Filed: 11/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of Interested Entities by Seth D. Neiman (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 11/7/2007) (Entered: 11/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 11/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Seth D. Neiman re 408 Answer to Amended Complaint (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 11/7/2007) (Entered: 11/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 408 Filed: 11/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Amended Complaint bySeth D. Neiman. (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 11/7/2007) (Entered: 11/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 10/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of Interested Entities by Neal Dempsey Or Persons (Bornstein, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/26/2007) (Entered: 10/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406 Filed: 10/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Answer to Amended Complaint Of Defendant Neal Dempsey To The Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint byNeal Dempsey. (Bornstein, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/26/2007) (Entered: 10/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 10/18/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/12/07 before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter: Lydia Zinn. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2007) (Entered: 10/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 381 Motion for Leave to File (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2007) (Entered: 10/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denied as moot 378 Motion to Shorten Time (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2007) (Entered: 10/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 399 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2007) (Entered: 10/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 398 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2007) (Entered: 10/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 397 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2007) (Entered: 10/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Michael A. Mugmon) ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611011413.) filed by Seth D. Neiman. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2007) (Entered: 10/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Jonathan A. Shapiro) ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611011412.) filed by Seth D. Neiman. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2007) (Entered: 10/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Jeffrey B. Rudman) ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611011411.) filed by Seth D. Neiman. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2007) (Entered: 10/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re 391 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Larry W. Sonsini, Attorney Stephen E. Taylor for Larry W. Sonsini added. Attorney Cameron Powers Hoffman; Christopher R. Howald; Mark Thomas Oakes; Michelle Jami Shapiro; Crystal Mothershead Gaudette and Steven Guggenheim terminated.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/12/07. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2007) (Entered: 10/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re 390 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Neal Dempsey, Attorney Christopher R. Howald; Mark Thomas Oakes; Michelle Jami Shapiro; Steven Guggenheim and Cameron Powers Hoffman terminated.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/12/07. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2007) (Entered: 10/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re 388 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Seth D. Neiman, Attorney Jeffrey B. Rudman for Seth D. Neiman, Jonathan Acker Shapiro for Seth D. Neiman added. Attorney Cameron Powers Hoffman; Christopher R. Howald; Mark Thomas Oakes; Michelle Jami Shapiro; Crystal Mothershead Gaudette and Steven Guggenheim terminated.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/12/07. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2007) (Entered: 10/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER re 387 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., Attorney John C. Dwyer for Brocade Communications Systems, Inc. added. Attorney Caz Hashemi; Cameron Powers Hoffman; Christopher R. Howald; Nina F. Locker; David Andrew McCarthy; Mark Thomas Oakes; Michelle Jami Shapiro; Crystal Mothershead Gaudette and Steven Guggenheim terminated.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/12/07. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2007) (Entered: 10/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 392 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 10/12/2007 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 10/12/2007) re 332 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Defendant Gregory Reyes on Elements (1-4) of Count I in APERS' Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Defendant Gregory Reyes on Elements (1-4) of Count I in APERS' Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System, 310 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System, 338 MOTION to Strike Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.'s Supplemental Response to Lead Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Admissions and Interrogatories filed by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn.) (be, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/12/2007) (Entered: 10/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Crystal Mothershead Gaudette for Larry W. Sonsini (Gaudette, Crystal) (Filed on 10/11/2007) (Entered: 10/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Crystal Mothershead Gaudette for Neal Dempsey (Gaudette, Crystal) (Filed on 10/11/2007) (Entered: 10/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey L. Bornstein for Neal Dempsey.(Bornstein, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/11/2007) Modified on 10/12/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Crystal Mothershead Gaudette for Seth D. Neiman (Gaudette, Crystal) (Filed on 10/11/2007) (Entered: 10/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Crystal Mothershead Gaudette for Brocade Communications Systems, Inc. (Gaudette, Crystal) (Filed on 10/11/2007) (Entered: 10/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Nina F. Locker in Support of 384 Defendant Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.'s Opposition to APERS' Motion to Strike all NERA Reports Filed by Brocade in Opposition to Class Certification filed byBrocade Communications Systems, Inc. (Guggenheim, Steven) (Filed on 10/10/2007) Modified on 10/11/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Steven D. Guggenheim in Support of 384 Defendant Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.'s Opposition to APERS' Motion to Strike all NERA Reports Filed by Brocade in Opposition to Class Certification filed byBrocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E)(Guggenheim, Steven) (Filed on 10/10/2007) Modified on 10/11/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in Opposition to 377 APERS' Motion to Strike all NERA Expert Reports Filed by Brocade in Opposition to Class Certification filed byBrocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Guggenheim, Steven) (Filed on 10/10/2007) Modified on 10/11/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 381 Motion for Leave to File, 382 Declaration of Bradley E. Beckworth and Proposed Order by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System (King, Laurence) (Filed on 10/9/2007) Modified on 10/10/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Bradley E. Beckworth in Support of 381 MOTION for Leave to File Expert Rebuttal Declaration filed byArkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (Related document(s) 381 ) (King, Laurence) (Filed on 10/9/2007) (Entered: 10/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Expert Rebuttal Declaration filed by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Proposed Order)(King, Laurence) (Filed on 10/9/2007) (Entered: 10/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 377 Motion to strike and proposed Order, 378 Motion to shorten time, 379 Declaration of Susan Whatley by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System (Fong, Linda) (Filed on 10/3/2007) Modified on 10/4/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Susan Whatley in Support of 378 MOTION to Shorten Time to Hear APERS' Motion to Strike All NERA Expert Reports Filed by Brocade in Opposition to Class Certification filed byArkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (Related document(s) 378 ) (Fong, Linda) (Filed on 10/3/2007) (Entered: 10/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Shorten Time to Hear APERS' Motion to Strike All NERA Expert Reports Filed by Brocade in Opposition to Class Certification filed by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Fong, Linda) (Filed on 10/3/2007) (Entered: 10/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Strike All NERA Expert Reports Filed by Brocade in Opposition to Class Certification filed by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System. Motion Hearing set for 10/12/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Fong, Linda) (Filed on 10/3/2007) (Entered: 10/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Change of Address by Michael David Braun (Braun, Michael) (Filed on 10/3/2007) (Entered: 10/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 372 Motion for Leave to File (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2007) (Entered: 10/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Order re 372 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-reply by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Guggenheim, Steven) (Filed on 10/1/2007) (Entered: 10/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Steven D. Guggenheim in Support of 372 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-reply filed byBrocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Related document(s) 372 ) (Guggenheim, Steven) (Filed on 10/1/2007) (Entered: 10/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Sur-reply filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit D continued)(Guggenheim, Steven) (Filed on 10/1/2007) (Entered: 10/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Reply to Opposition REPLY TO BROCADES OPPOSITION TO 338 APERS MOTION TO STRIKE BROCADE COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS, INC.S SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO LEAD PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS AND INTERROGATORIES filed byArkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (King, Laurence) (Filed on 9/28/2007) Modified on 10/1/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Reply to Opposition REPLY TO GREGORY REYES OPPOSITION TO 332 APERS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT GREGORY REYES ON ELEMENTS (1-4) OF COUNT I IN APERS AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed byArkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (King, Laurence) (Filed on 9/28/2007) Modified on 10/1/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gregory L. Reyes re 366 Memorandum in Opposition,, 367 Declaration in Opposition, 368 Proposed Order Denying APERS' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Waltzer, Garrett) (Filed on 9/21/2007) (Entered: 09/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Order Denying 332 APERS' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Gregory L. Reyes. (Waltzer, Garrett) (Filed on 9/21/2007) Modified on 9/25/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Jonah S. Van Zandt (and Request for Judicial Notice) in Opposition to 332 APERS' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byGregory L. Reyes. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 366 ) (Waltzer, Garrett) (Filed on 9/21/2007) Modified on 9/25/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum in Opposition re 332 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Defendant Gregory Reyes on Elements (1-4) of Count I in APERS' Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Defendant Gregory Reyes on Elements (1-4) of Count I in APERS' Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byGregory L. Reyes. (Waltzer, Garrett) (Filed on 9/21/2007) (Entered: 09/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in Opposition re 338 MOTION to Strike Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.'s Supplemental Response to Lead Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Admissions and Interrogatories filed byBrocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Guggenheim, Steven) (Filed on 9/21/2007) (Entered: 09/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re 361 Stipulation filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., Motions terminated: 306 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Antonio Canova, 329 MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, for Summary Adjudication of Claims filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., 349 MOTION to Continue Motion to Deny Brocade's Motion for Summary Judgment and Alternative Motion to Continue Hearing on Brocade's Motion for Summary Judgment and to Compel Discovery filed by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System, 351 MOTION to Strike Declaration of Frederick C. Dunbar and to Deny Brocade's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/19/07. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2007) (Entered: 09/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re 356 Stipulation filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., Set/Reset Deadlines as to 356 Stipulation, 332 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Defendant Gregory Reyes on Elements (1-4) of Count I in APERS' Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Defendant Gregory Reyes on Elements (1-4) of Count I in APERS' Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities. Motion Hearing set for 10/12/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/19/07. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2007) (Entered: 09/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER that the instant action, Consolidated Case No. 5-2042CRB be caption IN RE BROCADE SECURITIES LITIGATION re 348 Stipulation filed by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/19/07. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2007) (Entered: 09/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 9/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE PENDING MOTIONS by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Guggenheim, Steven) (Filed on 9/18/2007) (Entered: 09/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 358 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2007) (Entered: 09/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 357 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2007) (Entered: 09/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Ian D. Berg ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611010327.) filed by Erie County PA Employees Retirement System. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2007) (Entered: 09/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of John A. Kehoe ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611010326.) filed by Erie County PA Employees Retirement System. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2007) (Entered: 09/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION Stipulation And [Proposed] Order Re Hearing Dates On Pending Motions by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Guggenheim, Steven) (Filed on 9/10/2007) (Entered: 09/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/24/07 before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter: Sahar McVickar.. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2007) (Entered: 09/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing MotionS Hearing reset for 10/5/2007 02:30 PMin Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2007) (Entered: 09/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System (King, Laurence) (Filed on 8/31/2007) (Entered: 08/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Bradley E. Beckworth in Support of 351 MOTION to Strike Declaration of Frederick C. Dunbar and to Deny Brocade's Motion for Summary Judgment, 349 MOTION to Continue Motion to Deny Brocade's Motion for Summary Judgment and Alternative Motion to Continue Hearing on Brocade's Motion for Summary Judgment and to Compel Discovery filed byArkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D)(Related document(s) 351 , 349 ) (King, Laurence) (Filed on 8/31/2007) (Entered: 08/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Strike Declaration of Frederick C. Dunbar and to Deny Brocade's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System. Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(King, Laurence) (Filed on 8/31/2007) (Entered: 08/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Order re 349 MOTION to Continue Motion to Deny Brocade's Motion for Summary Judgment and Alternative Motion to Continue Hearing on Brocade's Motion for Summary Judgment and to Compel Discovery by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (King, Laurence) (Filed on 8/31/2007) (Entered: 08/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Continue Motion to Deny Brocade's Motion for Summary Judgment and Alternative Motion to Continue Hearing on Brocade's Motion for Summary Judgment and to Compel Discovery filed by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System. Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (King, Laurence) (Filed on 8/31/2007) (Entered: 08/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Changing Name by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (King, Laurence) (Filed on 8/31/2007) (Entered: 08/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                **Erroneous Duplicate Entry** ORDER granting Proposed Order re Pro Hac Vice for Robin Wechkin filed by Antonio Canova (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2007) Modified on 8/31/2007 (sv, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 328 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2007) (Entered: 08/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EXHIBITS re 337 Declaration in Support,, Corrected Exhibits A and E filed byArkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit E# 3 Proof of Service)(Related document(s) 337 ) (King, Laurence) (Filed on 8/29/2007) (Entered: 08/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 279 Motion to Dismiss. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2007) (Entered: 08/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 324 L B Pearlman's Motion for Pro Hac Vice (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2007) (Entered: 08/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 325 S Sharma's Motion for Pro Hac Vice (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2007) (Entered: 08/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 8/24/2007 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 8/24/2007) re 199 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Antonio Canova, 190 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Gregory L. Reyes's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Gregory L. Reyes, 197 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Michael Byrd, 196 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Brocade Communications Systems, Inc. and the Audit Committee Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Larry W. Sonsini, Nicholas G. Moore, Seth D. Neiman, Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., Christopher B Paisley, Mark Leslie, Neal Dempsey, 203 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by KPMG, L.L.P. (Court Reporter Sahar McVickar.) (be, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/24/2007) (Entered: 08/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System (Fong, Linda) (Filed on 8/24/2007) (Entered: 08/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Susan Whatley in Support of APERS' Motion to Strike Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.'s Supplemental Response to Lead Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Admissions and Interrogatories 338 filed by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Fong, Linda) (Filed on 8/24/2007) Modified on 8/27/2007 (sv, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Strike Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.'s Supplemental Response to Lead Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Admissions and Interrogatories filed by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System. Motion Hearing set for 10/12/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Fong, Linda) (Filed on 8/24/2007) (Entered: 08/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Susan Whatley in Support of Omnibus Reply to Defendants Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.'s and Greg Reyes' Oppositions to APERS' and Erie's Motion for Class Certification filed byArkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit H-1# 10 Exhibit H-2# 11 Exhibit H-3# 12 Exhibit H-4# 13 Exhibit H-5# 14 Exhibit H-6# 15 Exhibit H-7)(Fong, Linda) (Filed on 8/24/2007) (Entered: 08/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Reply Memorandum to Defendant Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.'s and Greg Reyes' Oppositions to APERS' and Erie's Motion for Class Certification filed byArkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (Fong, Linda) (Filed on 8/24/2007) (Entered: 08/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Reply Memorandum to Defendant Antonio Canova's Opposition to APERS' and Erie's Motion for Class Certification filed byArkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (Fong, Linda) (Filed on 8/24/2007) (Entered: 08/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 332 filed by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (Fong, Linda) (Filed on 8/24/2007) Modified on 8/27/2007 (sv, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Susan Whatley in Support of 332 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Defendant Gregory Reyes on Elements (1-4) of Count I in APERS' Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Defendant Gregory Reyes on Elements (1-4) of Count I in APERS' Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byArkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5)(Related document(s) 332 ) (Fong, Linda) (Filed on 8/24/2007) (Entered: 08/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Defendant Gregory Reyes on Elements (1-4) of Count I in APERS' Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System. Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Fong, Linda) (Filed on 8/24/2007) (Entered: 08/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 8/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Steven D. Guggenheim in Support of Defendant Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, for Summary Adjudication of Claims filed byBrocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5, 1 of 4# 6 Exhibit 5, 2 of 4# 7 Exhibit 5, 3 of 4# 8 Exhibit 5, 4 of 4# 9 Exhibit 6# 10 Exhibit 7# 11 Exhibit 8)(Guggenheim, Steven) (Filed on 8/23/2007) (Entered: 08/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 8/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Frederick C. Dunbar filed byBrocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Guggenheim, Steven) (Filed on 8/23/2007) (Entered: 08/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 8/23/2007, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, for Summary Adjudication of Claims filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Guggenheim, Steven) (Filed on 8/23/2007) (Entered: 08/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 8/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Robin Wechkin ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611009746) filed by Antonio Canova. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2007) (Entered: 08/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 8/23/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER RELATING CASE C-07-4223CRB to CR-06-0556CRB, C-06-2786CRB, C-05-2233CRB and C-05-2042CRB. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/23/07. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2007) (Entered: 08/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 8/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System re 324 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 3461100964.), Proposed Order, 325 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 3461100964.), Proposed Order (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2007) (Entered: 08/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 8/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION/Application for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Shivali Sharma ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611009649) filed by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2007) (Entered: 08/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 8/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION/Application for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Leisa B. Pearlman ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611009648) filed by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2007) (Entered: 08/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 8/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Seth D. Neiman, Neal Dempsey, Larry W. Sonsini re 279 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Attaching Supplemental Authority in Support of Motion to Dismiss Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Guggenheim, Steven) (Filed on 8/21/2007) (Entered: 08/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Frederick C. Dunbar Regarding Lead Plaintiff APERS' Purchases and Sales filed byBrocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3)(Guggenheim, Steven) (Filed on 8/3/2007) (Entered: 08/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Steven D. Guggenheim in Support of 319 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byBrocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6)(Related document(s) 319 ) (Guggenheim, Steven) (Filed on 8/3/2007) (Entered: 08/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joinder of Defendant Gregory L. Reyes in 319 Oppositions to Lead Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification Filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc. and Antonio Canova filed by Gregory L. Reyes. (Waltzer, Garrett) (Filed on 8/3/2007) Modified on 8/7/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum in Opposition re 310 MOTION to Certify Class Defendant Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.'s Opposition to APERS' Motion for Class Certification filed byBrocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Guggenheim, Steven) (Filed on 8/3/2007) (Entered: 08/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Alexander M. R. Lyon in Support of 317 Memorandum in Opposition TO APERS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed byAntonio Canova. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 317 ) (Blears, Norman) (Filed on 8/3/2007) (Entered: 08/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in Opposition to 310 APERS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed byAntonio Canova. (Blears, Norman) (Filed on 8/3/2007) Modified on 8/7/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Laurence D. King (King, Laurence) (Filed on 7/18/2007) (Entered: 07/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re 314 Stipulation filed by Larry W. Sonsini, Seth D. Neiman, Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., Neal Dempsey. Defendants' Oppositions re: Motion for Class Certification due 8/3/07. Class Reps.' Reply due 8/24/07. Motion Hearing set for 10/12/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/5/07. (epb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2007) (Entered: 07/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION and [Proposed] Scheduling Order by Seth D. Neiman, Neal Dempsey, Larry W. Sonsini, Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Howald, Christopher) (Filed on 6/29/2007) (Entered: 06/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 6/25/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/22/07. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2007) (Entered: 06/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System re 310 MOTION to Certify Class, 311 Declaration in Support, (Fong, Linda) (Filed on 6/22/2007) (Entered: 06/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Susan Whatley in Support of 310 MOTION to Certify Class filed byArkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G)(Related document(s) 310 ) (Fong, Linda) (Filed on 6/22/2007) (Entered: 06/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Certify Class filed by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System. Motion Hearing set for 8/10/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Fong, Linda) (Filed on 6/22/2007) (Entered: 06/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 6/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING CONFIDENTIALITY by Gregory L. Reyes. (Marmaro, Richard) (Filed on 6/21/2007) (Entered: 06/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 6/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY. FILED IN WRONG NUMBER *** Proposed Order re (91 in 3:06-cv-02786-CRB) First MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Canova's Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint by Antonio Canova. (Lyon, Alexander) (Filed on 6/18/2007) Modified on 6/19/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 6/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY. FILED IN WRONG CASE NUMBER *** Declaration of Alexander M.R. Lyon in Support of (91 in 3:06-cv-02786-CRB) First MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Canova's Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed byAntonio Canova. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lyon, Alexander) (Filed on 6/18/2007) Modified on 6/19/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 6/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY. FILED IN WRONG CASE NUMBER *** First MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Canova's Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Antonio Canova. Motion Hearing set for 8/24/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Lyon, Alexander) (Filed on 6/18/2007) Modified on 6/19/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 6/12/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 303 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Michelle J. Shapiro (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2007) (Entered: 06/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re 302 Stipulation filed by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 302 Stipulation, 279 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 8/24/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/24/2007 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/11/07. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2007) (Entered: 06/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Michelle J. Shapiro ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611007164.) filed by Seth D. Neiman, Neal Dempsey, Larry W. Sonsini, Brocade Communications Systems, Inc. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2007) (Entered: 06/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Continuing Motion to Dismiss Hearing and Case Management Conference by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (Fong, Linda) (Filed on 6/7/2007) (Entered: 06/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing, CLERK'S NOTICE Motion Hearing set for 6/15/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/15/2007 10:00 AM. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2007) (Entered: 06/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY *** NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony I. Fenwick (Fenwick, Anthony) (Filed on 6/4/2007) Modified on 6/6/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in Opposition Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition to 284 APERS' Request for Judicial Notice filed bySeth D. Neiman, Neal Dempsey, Larry W. Sonsini. (Oakes, Mark) (Filed on 5/29/2007) Modified on 5/30/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Antonio Canova Waiver of Objection to Law Clerk's Employment (Blears, Norman) (Filed on 5/23/2007) (Entered: 05/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 5/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request for Judicial Notice Dempsey, Neiman and Sonsini's Second Request for Judicial Notice in Support of 279 Motion to Dismiss Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed bySeth D. Neiman, Neal Dempsey, Larry W. Sonsini, Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., Gregory L. Reyes, Antonio Canova. (Guggenheim, Steven) (Filed on 5/18/2007) Modified on 5/21/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 5/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Steven D. Guggenheim Supplemental Declaration of Steven D. Guggenheim in Support of Dempsey, Neiman and Sonsini's 279 Motion to Dismiss Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed bySeth D. Neiman, Neal Dempsey, Larry W. Sonsini, Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., Gregory L. Reyes, Antonio Canova. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4)(Guggenheim, Steven) (Filed on 5/18/2007) Modified on 5/21/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 5/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition Dempsey, Neiman and Sonsini's Opposition to 284 Apers' Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Its Memorandum in Opposition to Dempsey, Neiman and Sonsini's Motion to Dismiss the Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed bySeth D. Neiman, Neal Dempsey, Larry W. Sonsini, Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., Gregory L. Reyes, Antonio Canova. (Guggenheim, Steven) (Filed on 5/18/2007) Modified on 5/21/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 5/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Reply Memorandum Dempsey, Neiman and Sonsini's Reply in Support of 279 Motion to Dismiss Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed bySeth D. Neiman, Neal Dempsey, Larry W. Sonsini, Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., Gregory L. Reyes, Antonio Canova. (Guggenheim, Steven) (Filed on 5/18/2007) Modified on 5/21/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 5/16/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re 292 Proposed Order filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., Further Case Management Conference set for 6/8/2007 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/16/07. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2007) (Entered: 05/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 5/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Order Joint Request for Case Management Conference and [Proposed Order] by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Oakes, Mark) (Filed on 5/15/2007) (Entered: 05/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and [Proposed] Order filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Oakes, Mark) (Filed on 5/7/2007) (Entered: 05/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 5/2/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 287 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2007) (Entered: 05/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Robert Buehler ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611005740.) filed by Antonio Canova. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2007) (Entered: 04/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirements System re 287 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 3461100573.), Received Order (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2007) (Entered: 04/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Sean Handler ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611005738.) filed by Oklahoma Firefighters Pension & Retirements System. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/1/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 283 Memorandum in Opposition, 284 Request for Judicial Notice, 285 Declaration of Susan Whatley by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System (Fong, Linda) (Filed on 4/27/2007) Modified on 5/1/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Susan Whatley in Support of 283 Memorandum in Opposition to Dempsey, Neiman and Sonsini's Motion to Dismiss the Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed byArkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D Part One# 5 Exhibit D Part Two# 6 Exhibit E# 7 Exhibit F# 8 Exhibit G)(Related document(s) 283 ) (Fong, Linda) (Filed on 4/27/2007) (Entered: 04/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request for Judicial Notice re 283 Memorandum in Opposition to Dempsey, Neiman and Sonsini's Motion to Dismiss the Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed byArkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (Related document(s) 283 ) (Fong, Linda) (Filed on 4/27/2007) (Entered: 04/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in Opposition re 279 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed byArkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (Fong, Linda) (Filed on 4/27/2007) (Entered: 04/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Regarding Page Limits re 278 Stipulation filed by Seth D. Neiman,, Neal Dempsey,, Larry W. Sonsini,. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/15/07. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2007) (Entered: 03/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Steven D. Guggenheim in Support of 280 Request for Judicial Notice, 279 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed bySeth D. Neiman, Neal Dempsey, Larry W. Sonsini. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J# 11 Exhibit K# 12 Exhibit L# 13 Exhibit M# 14 Exhibit N# 15 Exhibit O# 16 Exhibit P# 17 Exhibit Q# 18 Exhibit R# 19 Exhibit S# 20 Exhibit T# 21 Exhibit U# 22 Exhibit V# 23 Exhibit W)(Related document(s) 280 , 279 ) (Guggenheim, Steven) (Filed on 3/9/2007) (Entered: 03/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request for Judicial Notice re 279 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed bySeth D. Neiman, Neal Dempsey, Larry W. Sonsini. (Related document(s) 279 ) (Guggenheim, Steven) (Filed on 3/9/2007) (Entered: 03/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Seth D. Neiman, Neal Dempsey, Larry W. Sonsini. Motion Hearing set for 6/8/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Guggenheim, Steven) (Filed on 3/9/2007) (Entered: 03/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Page Limits by Seth D. Neiman, Neal Dempsey, Larry W. Sonsini. (Oakes, Mark) (Filed on 3/9/2007) (Entered: 03/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 2/28/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 266 Motion for Protective Order (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2007) (Entered: 02/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 2/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              [Amended Proposed] Order re 266 Third Party KPMG's Motion for Protective Order to Permit Coordination of Depositions of Neil Miotto and Matthew Brown by KPMG LLP. (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 2/22/2007) Modified on 2/23/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 2/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Geoffrey M. Ezgar in Support of 274 Response in Support of KPMG's Motion for Protective Order to Permit Coordination of Depositions ofNeil Miotto and Matthew Brown filed byKPMG LLP. (Related document(s) 274 ) (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 2/22/2007) (Entered: 02/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 2/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Support of 266 KPMG's Motion for Protective Order to Permit Coordination of Depositions of Neil Miotto and Matthew Brown filed byKPMG LLP. (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 2/22/2007) Modified on 2/23/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Support LEAD PLAINTIFF ARKANSAS PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM'S RESPONSE TO 266 KPMG'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER TO PERMIT COORDINATION OF DEPOSITIONS OF NEIL MIOTTO AND MATTHEW BROWN filed byArkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (King, Laurence) (Filed on 2/21/2007) Modified on 2/23/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 2/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to 266 KPMG's Motion for Protective Order to Permit Coordination of Depositions of Neil Miotto and Matthew Brown by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Oakes, Mark) (Filed on 2/16/2007) Modified on 2/21/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 2/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Order re 269 MOTION to Shorten Time on KPMG's Motion for Protective Order to Permit Coordination of Depositions of Neil Miotto and Matthew Brown by KPMG LLP. (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 2/15/2007) (Entered: 02/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 2/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Geoffrey M. Ezgar in Support of 269 MOTION to Shorten Time on KPMG's Motion for Protective Order to Permit Coordination of Depositions of Neil Miotto and Matthew Brown filed byKPMG LLP. (Related document(s) 269 ) (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 2/15/2007) (Entered: 02/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 2/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Shorten Time on KPMG's Motion for Protective Order to Permit Coordination of Depositions of Neil Miotto and Matthew Brown filed by KPMG LLP. Motion Hearing set for 2/23/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 2/15/2007) (Entered: 02/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 2/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Order in Support of Third Party KPMG LLP's Motion for Protective Order to Permit Coordination of Depositions of Neil Miotto and Matthew Brown by KPMG LLP. (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 2/15/2007) (Entered: 02/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 2/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Geoffrey M. Ezgar in Support of 266 Third Party MOTION for Protective Order to Permit Coordination of Depositions of Neil Miotto and Matthew Brown filed byKPMG LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) 266 ) (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 2/15/2007) (Entered: 02/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 2/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Third Party MOTION for Protective Order to Permit Coordination of Depositions of Neil Miotto and Matthew Brown filed by KPMG LLP. Motion Hearing set for 2/23/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 2/15/2007) (Entered: 02/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 2/15/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER re 264 Stipulation filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.,, Seth D. Neiman,, Neal Dempsey,, Larry W. Sonsini,. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/13/07. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2007) (Entered: 02/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION and [Proposed] order Regarding Briefing Schedule by Seth D. Neiman, Neal Dempsey, Larry W. Sonsini, Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Oakes, Mark) (Filed on 2/12/2007) (Entered: 02/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 1/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Amended Complaint byAntonio Canova. (Blears, Norman) (Filed on 1/29/2007) (Entered: 01/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 1/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Amended Complaint byBrocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Oakes, Mark) (Filed on 1/29/2007) (Entered: 01/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 1/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Amended Complaint Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Defendant Gregory L. Reyes to Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint byGregory L. Reyes. (Waltzer, Garrett) (Filed on 1/29/2007) (Entered: 01/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 1/23/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER to Continue Time to Answer re 259 Stipulation filed by Gregory L. Reyes,. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/19/07. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2007) (Entered: 01/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Continue Certain Defendants' Time to Answer Plaintiff's Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint by Gregory L. Reyes. (Waltzer, Garrett) (Filed on 1/19/2007) (Entered: 01/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re 257 Stipulation filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.,, Seth D. Neiman,, Neal Dempsey,, Larry W. Sonsini,, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 257 Stipulation. Motions due by 2/16/2007.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/17/07. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2007) (Entered: 01/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 1/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Briefing Schedule and Discovery by Seth D. Neiman, Neal Dempsey, Larry W. Sonsini, Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Oakes, Mark) (Filed on 1/12/2007) (Entered: 01/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 1/10/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 253 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2007) (Entered: 01/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 1/10/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 252 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2007) (Entered: 01/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 1/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System re 252 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, Received Order, 253 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, Received Order (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/9/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 1/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Corey D. McGaha filed by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System. FEE PAID. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/9/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 1/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of James C. Wyly filed by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System. FEE PAID. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/9/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 1/5/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/05/07. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2007) (Entered: 01/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 1/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION and [Proposed] Protective Order Regarding Confidentiality by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Oakes, Mark) (Filed on 1/4/2007) (Entered: 01/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 1/4/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER re 247 Stipulation filed by KPMG, L.L.P, Amended Pleadings due by 2/16/2007.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/03/07. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2007) (Entered: 01/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 1/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint against Seth D. Neiman, Neal Dempsey, Larry W. Sonsini, Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., Gregory L. Reyes, Antonio Canova. Filed byArkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(King, Laurence) (Filed on 1/2/2007) (Entered: 01/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 1/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION to Extend Time to File Amended Complaint by KPMG, L.L.P. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 1/2/2007) (Entered: 01/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/3/06 before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter: Katherine Wyatt. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2006) (Entered: 12/15/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re 244 Stipulation filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.,, Mark Leslie,, Seth D. Neiman,, Neal Dempsey,, Nicholas G. Moore,, Larry W. Sonsini,, Christopher B Paisley,. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/17/06. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2006) (Entered: 11/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 11/13/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION and [Proposed] Scheduling Order by Seth D. Neiman, Neal Dempsey, Mark Leslie, Larry W. Sonsini, Christopher B Paisley, Nicholas G. Moore, Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Howald, Christopher) (Filed on 11/13/2006) (Entered: 11/13/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 11/3/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 11/3/2006 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 11/3/2006) re 203 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by KPMG, L.L.P,, 197 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Michael Byrd,, 240 MOTION for Joinder Defendant Gregory L. Reyes's Joinder in Brocade Communication Systems, Inc. and the Audit Committee Defendants' Opposition to Lead Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Modification of the PSLRA Discovery Stay filed by Gregory L. Reyes,, 220 MOTION to Stay Lead Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Modification of the PSLRA Discovery Stay; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System,, 199 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Antonio Canova,, 196 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Brocade Communications Systems, Inc. and the Audit Committee Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.,, Mark Leslie,, Seth D. Neiman,, Neal Dempsey,, Nicholas G. Moore,, Larry W. Sonsini,, Christopher B Paisley,. (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.) (be, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/3/2006) (Entered: 11/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 10/19/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing Motion Hearing reset for 11/3/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2006) (Entered: 10/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 10/13/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joinder re 239 Memorandum in Opposition, to Plaintiff's Motion For Partial Modification of Discovery Stay by Antonio Canova. (Lyon, Alexander) (Filed on 10/13/2006) (Entered: 10/13/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Joinder Defendant Gregory L. Reyes's Joinder in Brocade Communication Systems, Inc. and the Audit Committee Defendants' Opposition to Lead Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Modification of the PSLRA Discovery Stay filed by Gregory L. Reyes. Motion Hearing set for 10/20/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Posner, Harriet) (Filed on 10/11/2006) (Entered: 10/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition Defendant Brocade Communications Systems, Inc. and the Audit Committee Defendants' Opposition to Lead Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Modification of the PSLRA Discovery Stay filed bySeth D. Neiman, Neal Dempsey, Mark Leslie, Larry W. Sonsini, Christopher B Paisley, Nicholas G. Moore, Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Hoffman, Cameron) (Filed on 10/11/2006) (Entered: 10/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 10/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request for Judicial Notice re 190 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Gregory L. Reyes's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendant Gregory L. Reyes's Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed byGregory L. Reyes. (Related document(s) 190 ) (Posner, Harriet) (Filed on 10/6/2006) (Entered: 10/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 10/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OBJECTIONS to re 190 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Gregory L. Reyes's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof Defendant Gregory L. Reyes's Objections to Plaintiffs' Request for Judicial Notice Submitted in Support of Plaintiffs' Responses to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss the Consolidated Complaint by Gregory L. Reyes. (Posner, Harriet) (Filed on 10/6/2006) (Entered: 10/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 10/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Whitney Walters in Support of 192 Defendant Gregory L. Reyes's Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice filed byGregory L. Reyes. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 17 - 18)(Related document(s) 190 ) (Posner, Harriet) (Filed on 10/6/2006) Modified on 10/11/2006 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 10/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Reply Memorandum re 190 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Gregory L. Reyes's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof Defendant Gregory L. Reyes's Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed byGregory L. Reyes. (Posner, Harriet) (Filed on 10/6/2006) (Entered: 10/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 10/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Reply Memorandum Audit Committee Defendants' Additional Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities on Individual Issues filed bySeth D. Neiman, Neal Dempsey, Mark Leslie, Larry W. Sonsini, Christopher B Paisley, Nicholas G. Moore, Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Hoffman, Cameron) (Filed on 10/6/2006) (Entered: 10/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 10/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in Opposition Defendants' Oppositionn to Lead Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Responses to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed bySeth D. Neiman, Neal Dempsey, Mark Leslie, Larry W. Sonsini, Christopher B Paisley, Nicholas G. Moore, Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Hoffman, Cameron) (Filed on 10/6/2006) (Entered: 10/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 10/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Reply Memorandum Defendant Brocade Communications Systems, Inc. and the Audit Committee Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed bySeth D. Neiman, Neal Dempsey, Mark Leslie, Larry W. Sonsini, Christopher B Paisley, Nicholas G. Moore, Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Hoffman, Cameron) (Filed on 10/6/2006) (Entered: 10/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 10/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Alexander M.R. Lyon in Support of 230 Reply to Opposition filed byAntonio Canova. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 230 ) (Lyon, Alexander) (Filed on 10/6/2006) (Entered: 10/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 10/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Reply to Opposition re 199 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed byAntonio Canova. (Lyon, Alexander) (Filed on 10/6/2006) (Entered: 10/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 10/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Reply to Opposition re 203 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed byKPMG, L.L.P. (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 10/6/2006) (Entered: 10/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 10/4/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 224 Motion to Shorten Time (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2006) (Entered: 10/04/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 10/2/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System re 226 Proposed Order,, 224 MOTION to Shorten Time to Hear Lead Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Modification of the PSLRA Discovery Stay (N.D. Cal. Local Rule 6-3(a)), 225 Declaration in Support, (Fong, Linda) (Filed on 10/2/2006) (Entered: 10/02/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 10/2/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Order re 224 MOTION to Shorten Time to Hear Lead Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Modification of the PSLRA Discovery Stay (N.D. Cal. Local Rule 6-3(a)) by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (Fong, Linda) (Filed on 10/2/2006) (Entered: 10/02/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 10/2/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Bradley E. Beckworth in Support of 224 MOTION to Shorten Time to Hear Lead Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Modification of the PSLRA Discovery Stay (N.D. Cal. Local Rule 6-3(a)) filed byArkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (Related document(s) 224 ) (Fong, Linda) (Filed on 10/2/2006) (Entered: 10/02/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 10/2/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Shorten Time to Hear Lead Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Modification of the PSLRA Discovery Stay (N.D. Cal. Local Rule 6-3(a)) filed by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (Fong, Linda) (Filed on 10/2/2006) (Entered: 10/02/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System re 221 Declaration in Support,, 222 Proposed Order,, 220 MOTION to Stay Lead Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Modification of the PSLRA Discovery Stay; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof (Fong, Linda) (Filed on 9/29/2006) (Entered: 09/29/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Order re 220 MOTION to Stay Lead Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Modification of the PSLRA Discovery Stay; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (Fong, Linda) (Filed on 9/29/2006) (Entered: 09/29/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Linda M. Fong in Support of 220 MOTION to Stay Lead Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Modification of the PSLRA Discovery Stay; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byArkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 220 ) (Fong, Linda) (Filed on 9/29/2006) (Entered: 09/29/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Stay Lead Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Modification of the PSLRA Discovery Stay; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System. Motion Hearing set for 11/3/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Fong, Linda) (Filed on 9/29/2006) (Entered: 09/29/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 212 , 213 , 214 , 218 by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System (King, Laurence) (Filed on 9/15/2006) Modified on 9/18/2006 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/15/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Lead Plaintiff's Responses to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed byArkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (King, Laurence) (Filed on 9/15/2006) (Entered: 09/15/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EXHIBITS re 214 Declaration in Support, Exhibit M-15(b)(part 1) filed byArkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit M-15(b)(part 2)# 2 Exhibit M-16# 3 Exhibit N(part 1)# 4 Exhibit N(part 2)# 5 Exhibit O# 6 Exhibit P# 7 Exhibit Q# 8 Exhibit R# 9 Exhibit S)(Related document(s) 214 ) (King, Laurence) (Filed on 9/15/2006) (Entered: 09/15/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EXHIBITS re 214 Declaration in Support, Exhibit M-8 filed byArkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit M-9# 2 Exhibit M-10# 3 Exhibit M-11# 4 Exhibit M-12# 5 Exhibit M-13# 6 Exhibit M-14# 7 Exhibit M-15(a)(part 1)# 8 Exhibit M-15(a)(part 2))(Related document(s) 214 ) (King, Laurence) (Filed on 9/15/2006) (Entered: 09/15/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EXHIBITS re 214 Declaration in Support, filed byArkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit L# 2 Exhibit M-1# 3 Exhibit M-2# 4 Exhibit M-3# 5 Exhibit M-4(part 1)# 6 Exhibit M-4(part 2)# 7 Exhibit M-5# 8 Exhibit M-6# 9 Exhibit M-7)(Related document(s) 214 ) (King, Laurence) (Filed on 9/15/2006) (Entered: 09/15/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Bradley E Beckworth in Support of Responses to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed byArkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J)(King, Laurence) (Filed on 9/15/2006) (Entered: 09/15/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in Opposition LEAD PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT KPMG'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed byArkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (King, Laurence) (Filed on 9/15/2006) (Entered: 09/15/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in Opposition LEAD PLAINTIFF'S OMNIBUS RESPONSE TO CERTAIN DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS THE CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed byArkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix 1)(King, Laurence) (Filed on 9/15/2006) (Entered: 09/15/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 9/11/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re 210 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System,, Michael Byrd terminated.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/11/06. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2006) (Entered: 09/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 9/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Michael Byrd by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System (King, Laurence) (Filed on 9/8/2006) (Entered: 09/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 8/28/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 208 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2006) (Entered: 08/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Admission of Attorney Susan Whatley to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Fee Paid $210.00, receipt number 3389168) filed by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2006) (Entered: 08/24/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 8/9/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 206 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2006) (Entered: 08/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Jeffrey J. Angelovich filed by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System. FEE PAID. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2006) (Entered: 08/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re 189 Stipulation filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.,, Mark Leslie,, Seth D. Neiman,, Neal Dempsey,, Nicholas G. Moore,, Larry W. Sonsini,, Christopher B Paisley,. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/17/06. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2006) (Entered: 07/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Appendix re 203 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed byKPMG, L.L.P. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H)(Related document(s) 203 ) (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 7/14/2006) (Entered: 07/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by KPMG, L.L.P. Motion Hearing set for 10/20/2006 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1)(Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 7/14/2006) (Entered: 07/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Cameron P. Hoffman in Support of 196 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Brocade Communications Systems, Inc. and the Audit Committee Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed bySeth D. Neiman, Neal Dempsey, Mark Leslie, Larry W. Sonsini, Christopher B Paisley, Nicholas G. Moore, Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J# 11 Exhibit K# 12 Exhibit L)(Related document(s) 196 ) (Hoffman, Cameron) (Filed on 7/14/2006) (Entered: 07/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Order re 199 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint by Antonio Canova. (Lyon, Alexander) (Filed on 7/14/2006) (Entered: 07/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Alexander Lyon in Support of 199 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed byAntonio Canova. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 199 ) (Lyon, Alexander) (Filed on 7/14/2006) (Entered: 07/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Antonio Canova. Motion Hearing set for 10/20/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Lyon, Alexander) (Filed on 7/14/2006) (Entered: 07/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re 196 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Brocade Communications Systems, Inc. and the Audit Committee Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities Audit Committee Defendants' Additional Memorandum of Points and Authorities on Individual Issues filed bySeth D. Neiman, Neal Dempsey, Mark Leslie, Larry W. Sonsini, Christopher B Paisley, Nicholas G. Moore, Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Related document(s) 196 ) (Hoffman, Cameron) (Filed on 7/14/2006) (Entered: 07/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Michael Byrd. Motion Hearing set for 10/20/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 7/14/2006) (Entered: 07/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Brocade Communications Systems, Inc. and the Audit Committee Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Seth D. Neiman, Neal Dempsey, Mark Leslie, Larry W. Sonsini, Christopher B Paisley, Nicholas G. Moore, Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/20/2006 10:00 AM. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint)(Hoffman, Cameron) (Filed on 7/14/2006) (Entered: 07/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gregory L. Reyes re 192 Request for Judicial Notice,,, 193 Request for Judicial Notice,, 190 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Gregory L. Reyes's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, 194 Proposed Order,, 191 Declaration in Support,, Proof of Service (Posner, Harriet) (Filed on 7/14/2006) (Entered: 07/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Order re 190 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Gregory L. Reyes's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, 192 Request for Judicial Notice,,, 191 Declaration in Support,, [Proposed] Order Granting Defendant Gregory L. Reyes's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint by Gregory L. Reyes. (Posner, Harriet) (Filed on 7/14/2006) (Entered: 07/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed bySeth D. Neiman, Neal Dempsey, Mark Leslie, Larry W. Sonsini, Christopher B Paisley, Nicholas G. Moore, Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Hoffman, Cameron) (Filed on 7/14/2006) (Entered: 07/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request for Judicial Notice re 190 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Gregory L. Reyes's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, 191 Declaration in Support,, Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendant Gregory L. Reyes's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed byGregory L. Reyes. (Related document(s) 190 , 191 ) (Posner, Harriet) (Filed on 7/14/2006) (Entered: 07/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Ronda McKaig in Support of 190 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Gregory L. Reyes's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof Declaration of Ronda McKaig in Support of Defendant Gregory L. Reyes's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed byGregory L. Reyes. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-6# 2 Exhibit Exhibits 7-12# 3 Exhibit Exhibit 13# 4 Exhibit Exhibits 14-16)(Related document(s) 190 ) (Posner, Harriet) (Filed on 7/14/2006) (Entered: 07/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Gregory L. Reyes's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Gregory L. Reyes. Motion Hearing set for 10/20/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Posner, Harriet) (Filed on 7/14/2006) (Entered: 07/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Page Limits by Seth D. Neiman, Neal Dempsey, Mark Leslie, Larry W. Sonsini, Christopher B Paisley, Nicholas G. Moore, Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Oakes, Mark) (Filed on 7/12/2006) (Entered: 07/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 6/9/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion, Set/Reset Deadlines as to Motion Hearing set for 10/20/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/8/06. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2006) (Entered: 06/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick C. Doolittle counsel for Michael Byrd (Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 6/7/2006) (Entered: 06/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Briefing Schedule by Seth D. Neiman, Neal Dempsey, Mark Leslie, Larry W. Sonsini, Christopher B Paisley, Nicholas G. Moore, Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Oakes, Mark) (Filed on 6/7/2006) (Entered: 06/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 5/22/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 180 Motion to Relate Case C-06-2786MMC to C-05-2042CRB (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2006) (Entered: 05/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 5/19/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in Opposition To Administrative Motion To Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed byAndrew E. Roth. (Jonckheer, Willem) (Filed on 5/19/2006) (Entered: 05/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 5/16/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc. re 180 MOTION to Related Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related, 182 Proposed Order, 181 Declaration in Support, (Oakes, Mark) (Filed on 5/16/2006) (Entered: 05/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 5/16/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Order re 180 MOTION to Related Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related, 181 Declaration in Support, by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Oakes, Mark) (Filed on 5/16/2006) (Entered: 05/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 5/16/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Nina F. Locker in Support of 180 MOTION to Related Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related filed byBrocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 180 ) (Oakes, Mark) (Filed on 5/16/2006) (Entered: 05/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 5/16/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Related Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Oakes, Mark) (Filed on 5/16/2006) (Entered: 05/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 5/9/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Brooks Martin, III (Martin, Robert) (Filed on 5/9/2006) (Entered: 05/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 5/8/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re 177 Stipulation filed by KPMG, L.L.P,, ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 177 Stipulation: Motions due by 6/23/2006. Opposition due by 8/21/2006. Reply due by 9/21/2006. Motion Hearing set for 10/20/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/08/06. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2006) (Entered: 05/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 5/3/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION and [Proposed] Scheduling Order by KPMG, L.L.P. (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 5/3/2006) (Entered: 05/03/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 4/18/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re 172 Notice of Change In Counsel filed by Antonio Canova,, Attorney Norman J. Blears for Antonio Canova, Alexander M.R. Lyon for Antonio Canova, Matthew C. Holohan for Antonio Canova added.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/17/06. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2006) (Entered: 04/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 4/14/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 04/14/06. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2006) (Entered: 04/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 4/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., Gregory L. Reyes, Antonio Canova. Filed byArkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Fong, Linda) (Filed on 4/14/2006) (Entered: 04/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 4/13/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION and [Proposed] Scheduling Order by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Oakes, Mark) (Filed on 4/13/2006) (Entered: 04/13/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 4/13/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Alexander M.R. Lyon for Antonio Canova (Lyon, Alexander) (Filed on 4/13/2006) (Entered: 04/13/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 4/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System re 170 Request, Received Order (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2006) (Entered: 04/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 4/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION for admission of Sean F. Rommel pro hac vice by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System. FEE PAID. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2006) (Entered: 04/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 4/10/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice: Sean Rommel. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/10/06. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2006) (Entered: 04/10/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 3/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gregory L. Reyes re 167 Order Proof of Service for Order re Notice of Change of Law Firm Association and Substitution of Attorney (DiCanio, Jack) (Filed on 3/20/2006) (Entered: 03/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 3/17/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re 166 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Gregory L. Reyes,. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/16/06. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2006) (Entered: 03/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 3/3/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Jack Patrick DiCanio Notice of Change of Law Firm Association and Substitution of Attorney for Defendant Gregory Reyes (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(DiCanio, Jack) (Filed on 3/3/2006) (Entered: 03/03/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 3/1/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 158 Motion for Extension of Time to File (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2006) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/3/2006 (be, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., Gregory L. Reyes, Antonio Canova re 162 Memorandum in Opposition,, 163 Declaration in Support (Oakes, Mark) (Filed on 2/28/2006) (Entered: 02/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Mark T. Oakes in Support of 162 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byBrocade Communications Systems, Inc., Gregory L. Reyes, Antonio Canova. (Related document(s) 162 ) (Oakes, Mark) (Filed on 2/28/2006) (Entered: 02/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in Opposition re 158 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Its Consolidated Amended Complaint Under N.D. Cal. Local Rule 6-3(a) filed byBrocade Communications Systems, Inc., Gregory L. Reyes, Antonio Canova. (Oakes, Mark) (Filed on 2/28/2006) (Entered: 02/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 2/27/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System re 158 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Its Consolidated Amended Complaint Under N.D. Cal. Local Rule 6-3(a), 159 Declaration in Support,, 160 Proposed Order (Fong, Linda) (Filed on 2/27/2006) (Entered: 02/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 2/27/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Order re 158 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Its Consolidated Amended Complaint Under N.D. Cal. Local Rule 6-3(a) by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (Fong, Linda) (Filed on 2/27/2006) (Entered: 02/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 2/27/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Bradley E. Beckworth in Support of 158 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Its Consolidated Amended Complaint Under N.D. Cal. Local Rule 6-3(a) filed byArkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F)(Related document(s) 158 ) (Fong, Linda) (Filed on 2/27/2006) (Entered: 02/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 2/27/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File Its Consolidated Amended Complaint Under N.D. Cal. Local Rule 6-3(a) filed by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (Fong, Linda) (Filed on 2/27/2006) (Entered: 02/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 1/12/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 29 Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel, denying 32 Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel, denying 38 Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel, granting 52 Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel. Counsel for APERS shall file a consolidated complaint by 3/3/06. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2006) Modified on 1/13/2006 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 11/15/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Brief re 155 Order on Motion for Leave to File ARKANSAS PUBLIC EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT SYSTEM'S REPLY TO INTREPID MANAGEMENT'S SUR-REPLY filed byArkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (Related document(s) 155 ) (King, Laurence) (Filed on 11/15/2005) (Entered: 11/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 11/15/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 153 Motion for Leave to File (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2005) (Entered: 11/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 11/8/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System re 153 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Intrepid Capital Management's Sur-Reply (King, Laurence) (Filed on 11/8/2005) (Entered: 11/08/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 11/8/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Response to Intrepid Capital Management's Sur-Reply filed by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Proposed Order)(King, Laurence) (Filed on 11/8/2005) (Entered: 11/08/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 11/7/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Intrepid Capital Management re 151 Brief, in Sur-reply. Surreply Brief Correcting Material Inaccuracies in Competing Movants' Submissions (Goldberg, Michael) (Filed on 11/7/2005) (Entered: 11/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 11/7/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Brief re 150 Order on Motion for Leave to File Surreply. Surreply Brief of Intrepid Capital Management, Inc. Correcting Material Inaccuracies In Competing Movants' Submissions filed byIntrepid Capital Management. (Related document(s) 150 ) (Goldberg, Michael) (Filed on 11/7/2005) (Entered: 11/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 11/3/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 149 Motion for Leave to File (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2005) (Entered: 11/03/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 11/1/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File SUR-REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO BE APPOINTED LEAD PLAINTIFF; PROPOSED ORDER THEREON filed by Intrepid Capital Management. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - SURREPLY)(Goldberg, Michael) (Filed on 11/1/2005) (Entered: 11/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 10/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Support Lead Plaintiff Motion filed byJohn W Geary, III. (Shingler, Arthur) (Filed on 10/28/2005) (Entered: 10/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 10/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of ROBIN WINCHESTER IN SUPPORT OF SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW BY THE OKLAHMOMA FIREFIGHTERS PENSION & RETIREMENT SYSTEM IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVAL OF LEAD COUNSEL filed byPrena Smajlaj. (Green, Robert) (Filed on 10/28/2005) (Entered: 10/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 10/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW BY THE OKLAHOMA FIREFIGHTERS PENSION & RETIREMENT SYSTEM IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVAL OF LEAD COUNSEL filed byPrena Smajlaj. (Green, Robert) (Filed on 10/28/2005) Modified on 10/31/2005 (ewn, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 10/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Response re 142 Motion Hearing,,,, ARKANSAS PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM'S SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM REGARDING INTREPID CAPITAL MANAGEMENT'S INABILITY TO SERVE AS LEAD PLAINTIFF byArkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (King, Laurence) (Filed on 10/28/2005) (Entered: 10/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 10/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Intrepid Capital Management re 143 Response ( Non Motion ), SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF INTREPID CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, INC.'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF (Goldberg, Michael) (Filed on 10/28/2005) Modified on 10/31/2005 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 10/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to re 142 Motion Hearing,,,, SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF INTREPID CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, INC.S MOTION TO BE APPOINTED LEAD PLAINTFF by Intrepid Capital Management. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Goldberg, Michael) (Filed on 10/28/2005) (Entered: 10/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 10/19/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 10/7/2005 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 10/19/2005) re 29 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support Thereof filed by City of Hialeah Employees' Retirement System,, 52 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System,, 38 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel And for Consolidation of Related Actions filed by Intrepid Capital Management,, 43 First MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Giulio Cessario,, 69 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and for Lead Plaintiff Appointment filed by John W Geary, III, 26 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel Notice of Motion and Motion; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support thereof filed by Steven Eisenfrats,, Suzanne Patrick,, 32 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Huang Group,. (Court Reporter Sahar McVickar.) (be, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/19/2005) (Entered: 10/19/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 9/30/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System (King, Laurence) (Filed on 9/30/2005) (Entered: 09/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 9/30/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Laurence D. King in Support of 137 Reply Memorandum ARKANSAS PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM'S SUR-REPLY TO ALL OTHER MOVANTS' OPPOSITIONS TO ITS APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF filed byArkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 137 ) (King, Laurence) (Filed on 9/30/2005) (Entered: 09/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 9/30/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by OKLAHOMA FIREFIGHTERS PENSION & RETIREMENTS SYSTEM re 136 Memorandum in Support,, 138 Declaration in Support, (Green, Robert) (Filed on 9/30/2005) (Entered: 09/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 9/30/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Robin Winchester in Support of 136 Memorandum in Support, filed byOKLAHOMA FIREFIGHTERS PENSION & RETIREMENTS SYSTEM. (Attachments: # 1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) # 2 Exhibits A to F# 3 Exhibits G to L# 4 Exhibits M to T)(Related document(s) 136 ) (Green, Robert) (Filed on 9/30/2005) (Entered: 09/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 9/30/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Reply Memorandum ARKANSAS PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM'S SUR-REPLY TO ALL OTHER MOVANTS' OPPOSITIONS TO ITS APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF filed byArkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (King, Laurence) (Filed on 9/30/2005) (Entered: 09/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 9/30/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW BY THE OKLAHOMA FIREFIGHTERS PENSION & RETIREMENT SYSTEM IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVAL OF LEAD COUNSEL 63 filed byOKLAHOMA FIREFIGHTERS PENSION & RETIREMENTS SYSTEM. (Green, Robert) (Filed on 9/30/2005) (Entered: 09/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 9/30/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Intrepid Capital Management re 133 Brief,, 134 Declaration in Support, SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF AND DECLARATION IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION OF INTREPID CAPITAL MANAGEMENT FOR APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF (Goldberg, Michael) (Filed on 9/30/2005) (Entered: 09/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 9/30/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Joseph Seidman, Jr. in Support of 133 Brief, RESPONSE - SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF INTREPID CAPITAL MANAGMENT, INC.'S MOTION TO BE APPOINTED LEAD PLAINTIFF filed byIntrepid Capital Management. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Errata E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J# 11 Exhibit K# 12 Exhibit L)(Related document(s) 133 ) (Goldberg, Michael) (Filed on 9/30/2005) (Entered: 09/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 9/30/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Brief re 129 Motion Hearing,,,,,,,,, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,,,,,,,,, Set/Clear Flags,,,,,,,, RESPONSE - SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF INTREPID CAPITAL MANAGMENT, INC.'S MOTION TO BE APPOINTED LEAD PLAINTIFF filed byIntrepid Capital Management. (Related document(s) 129 ) (Goldberg, Michael) (Filed on 9/30/2005) (Entered: 09/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 9/30/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., Antonio Canova re 131 Brief Defendants Brocade and Canova's Memorandum Regarding Consolidation or Coordination of Class Actions with Derivative Actions (Guggenheim, Steven) (Filed on 9/30/2005) (Entered: 09/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 9/30/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Brief Defendants Brocade and Canova's Memorandum Regarding Consolidation or Coordination of Class Actions with Derivative Actions filed byBrocade Communications Systems, Inc., Antonio Canova. (Guggenheim, Steven) (Filed on 9/30/2005) (Entered: 09/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 8/31/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Giulio Cessario re 43 First MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF GIULIO D. CESSARIO'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF AND FOR APPROVAL OF HIS SELECTION OF COUNSEL (Braun, Michael) (Filed on 8/31/2005) (Entered: 08/31/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 8/26/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 8/26/2005 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 8/26/2005) re 29 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support Thereof filed by City of Hialeah Employees' Retirement System,, 52 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System,, 38 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel And for Consolidation of Related Actions filed by Intrepid Capital Management,, 43 First MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Giulio Cessario,, 69 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and for Lead Plaintiff Appointment filed by John W Geary, III, 26 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel Notice of Motion and Motion; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support thereof filed by Steven Eisenfrats,, Suzanne Patrick,, 32 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Huang Group,, Set Deadlines/Hearing as to 29 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support Thereof, 52 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Consolidate Cases, 38 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel And for Consolidation of Related Actions, 43 First MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel, 69 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and for Lead Plaintiff Appointment, 26 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel Notice of Motion and Motion; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support thereof, 32 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel: held on 8/26/2005 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 8/26/2005). Responses due by 9/30/2005. Motion Hearing set for 10/7/2005 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Court Reporter Debra Pas.) (be, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/26/2005) (Entered: 08/26/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 8/25/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Giulio Cessario re 43 First MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOVANT GIULIO D. CESSARIO'S NOTICE REGARDING ORAL ARGUMENT (Braun, Michael) (Filed on 8/25/2005) (Entered: 08/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 8/25/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 125 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2005) (Entered: 08/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 8/25/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 124 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2005) (Entered: 08/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 8/23/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of attorney Gregory M. Egleston filed by Intrepid Capital Management. FEE PAID. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2005) (Entered: 08/24/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 8/23/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of attorney Uri Seth Ottensoser filed by Intrepid Capital Management. FEE PAID. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2005) (Entered: 08/24/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 8/24/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 121 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2005) (Entered: 08/24/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 8/22/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System re 121 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, Received Order re 121 (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2005) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/24/2005 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 8/22/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of attorney Bradley E. Beckworth filed by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System. FEE PAID, Receipt # 3375705. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2005) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/24/2005 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 119 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2005) (Entered: 08/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 8/16/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of attorney Robin Winchester filed by OKLAHOMA FIREFIGHTERS PENSION & RETIREMENTS SYSTEM. Fee paid. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2005) (Entered: 08/16/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 8/12/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Reply Memorandum of Geary Group in Support of Lead Plaintiff Motion filed byJohn W Geary, III. (Shingler, Arthur) (Filed on 8/12/2005) (Entered: 08/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 8/12/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System re 112 , 116 . (King, Laurence) (Filed on 8/12/2005) Modified on 8/15/2005 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 8/12/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Laurence D. King in Support of 112 Reply Memorandum to All Other Movants' Oppositions to its Motion for Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel filed byArkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 112 ) (King, Laurence) (Filed on 8/12/2005) (Entered: 08/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 8/12/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by OKLAHOMA FIREFIGHTERS PENSION & RETIREMENTS SYSTEM re 113 Reply Memorandum, 114 Declaration in Support (Green, Robert) (Filed on 8/12/2005) (Entered: 08/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 8/12/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Robin Winchester in Support of 113 Reply Memorandum filed byOKLAHOMA FIREFIGHTERS PENSION & RETIREMENTS SYSTEM. (Related document(s) 113 ) (Green, Robert) (Filed on 8/12/2005) (Entered: 08/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 8/12/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Reply Memorandum 63 filed byOKLAHOMA FIREFIGHTERS PENSION & RETIREMENTS SYSTEM. (Green, Robert) (Filed on 8/12/2005) (Entered: 08/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 8/12/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Reply Memorandum re 52 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed byArkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (King, Laurence) (Filed on 8/12/2005) (Entered: 08/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 8/12/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Reply Memorandum re 38 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel And for Consolidation of Related Actions and In Opposition to Competing Motions filed byIntrepid Capital Management. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel# 2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel)(Goldberg, Michael) (Filed on 8/12/2005) (Entered: 08/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 8/12/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Reply Memorandum re 43 First MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed byGiulio Cessario. (Braun, Michael) (Filed on 8/12/2005) (Entered: 08/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 8/8/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 93 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2005) (Entered: 08/08/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 8/8/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 92 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2005) (Entered: 08/08/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by OKLAHOMA FIREFIGHTERS PENSION & RETIREMENTS SYSTEM re 105 Memorandum in Opposition,, 106 Declaration in Support, (Green, Robert) (Filed on 8/5/2005) (Entered: 08/05/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of ROBIN WINCHESTER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO APPOINT THE OKLAHOMA FIREFIGHTERS PENSION & RETIREMENT SYSTEM AS LEAD PLAINTIFF PURSUANT TO SECTION 21D(a)(3)(B) OF THE SECURITIES EXCHANGE ACT OF 1934 AND TO APPROVE LEAD PLAINTIFF'S CHOICE OF COUNSEL 63 filed byOKLAHOMA FIREFIGHTERS PENSION & RETIREMENTS SYSTEM. (Green, Robert) (Filed on 8/5/2005) (Entered: 08/05/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in Opposition MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES BY THE OKLAHOMA FIREFIGHTERS PENSION & RETIREMENT SYSTEM IN RESPONSE TO COMPETING MOTIONS FOR APPOINTMENT OF LEAD PLAINTIFF AND FOR APPROVAL OF LEAD COUNSEL [26, 29, 32, 38, 43, 52, 69] filed byOKLAHOMA FIREFIGHTERS PENSION & RETIREMENTS SYSTEM. (Green, Robert) (Filed on 8/5/2005) (Entered: 08/05/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in Opposition to Competing Motions for Lead Plaintiff Appointment filed byJohn W Geary, III. (Shingler, Arthur) (Filed on 8/5/2005) (Entered: 08/05/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System (King, Laurence) (Filed on 8/5/2005) (Entered: 08/05/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Laurence D. King in Support of 101 Memorandum in Opposition, TO INTREPID CAPITAL MANAGEMENT'S, AND ALL OTHER MOVANTS', MOTIONS FOR APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF AND REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY filed byArkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 101 ) (King, Laurence) (Filed on 8/5/2005) (Entered: 08/05/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in Opposition TO INTREPID CAPITAL MANAGEMENT'S, AND ALL OTHER MOVANTS', MOTIONS FOR APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF AND REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY filed byArkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (King, Laurence) (Filed on 8/5/2005) (Entered: 08/05/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Prena Smajlaj re 98 Memorandum in Opposition, 99 Declaration in Support, (Goldberg, Michael) (Filed on 8/5/2005) (Entered: 08/05/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration in Support of 98 Memorandum in Opposition DECLARATION OF MATTHEW ZWEIG IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED CASES, APPOINT LEAD PLAINTIFF, AND FOR APPROVAL OF LEAD COUNSEL, AND IN OPPOSITION TO COMPETING MOTIONS filed byPrena Smajlaj. (Related document(s) 98 ) (Goldberg, Michael) (Filed on 8/5/2005) (Entered: 08/05/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in Opposition TO COMPETING MOTIONS AND IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED CASES, APPOINT LEAD PLAINTIFF, AND FOR APPROVAL OF LEAD COUNSEL filed byPrena Smajlaj. (Goldberg, Michael) (Filed on 8/5/2005) (Entered: 08/05/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in Opposition TO COMPETING MOTIONS FOR APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF filed byGiulio Cessario. (Braun, Michael) (Filed on 8/5/2005) (Entered: 08/05/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Steven Eisenfrats re 26 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel Notice of Motion and Motion; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support thereof Notice of Withdrawal of Motion of Steven Eisenfrats and Suzanne Patrick (Rickert, Rachele) (Filed on 8/5/2005) (Entered: 08/05/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., Antonio Canova re 94 Statement of Non-Opposition, (McCarthy, David) (Filed on 8/5/2005) (Entered: 08/05/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statement of Non-Opposition Defendants' Omnibus Statement of Non-Opposition to Consolidation and Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed byBrocade Communications Systems, Inc., Antonio Canova. (McCarthy, David) (Filed on 8/5/2005) (Entered: 08/05/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of attorney Sandy A. Liebhard filed by Intrepid Capital Management. FEE PAID. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2005) (Entered: 08/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of attorney Joseph R. Seidman, Jr. filed by Intrepid Capital Management. FEE PAID. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2005) (Entered: 08/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 8/2/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re 89 Stipulation filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.,, Antonio Canova,. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/01/05. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2005) (Entered: 08/02/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 7/29/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., Antonio Canova re 89 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Postponing Case Management Conference (McCarthy, David) (Filed on 7/29/2005) (Entered: 07/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 7/29/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Postponing Case Management Conference by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., Antonio Canova. (McCarthy, David) (Filed on 7/29/2005) (Entered: 07/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 7/26/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Intrepid Capital Management re 87 Notice (Other) Amending Notice of Hearing to August 26, 2005 (Goldberg, Michael) (Filed on 7/26/2005) (Entered: 07/26/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 7/26/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Intrepid Capital Management re 38 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel And for Consolidation of Related Actions Amending Notice For Hearing To August 26, 2005 (Goldberg, Michael) (Filed on 7/26/2005) (Entered: 07/26/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 7/25/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 80 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2005) (Entered: 07/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 7/25/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 79 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2005) (Entered: 07/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 7/25/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER RELATING CASE C-05-2374SBA, C-05-2652MJJ and C-05-2692SBA with case C-05-2042CRB. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/21/05. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2005) (Entered: 07/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 7/25/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 23 Motion to Relate Case (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2005) (Entered: 07/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 7/19/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of Counsel Certification of Richard A. Adams Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) by Laurence D. King on behalf of Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System (King, Laurence) (Filed on 7/19/2005) (Entered: 07/19/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 7/19/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of Counsel Certification of Laurence D. King Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) by Laurence D. King on behalf of Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System (King, Laurence) (Filed on 7/19/2005) (Entered: 07/19/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of attorney George L. McWilliams filed by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System. FEE PAID. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2005) (Entered: 07/19/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of attorney Richard A. Adams filed by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System. FEE PAID. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2005) (Entered: 07/19/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 7/19/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City of Hialeah Employees' Retirement System re 29 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support Thereof, 30 Declaration in Support,, 31 Proposed Order, (Bulawsky, Kelly) (Filed on 7/19/2005) (Entered: 07/19/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 7/19/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 32 , 33 , 34 and 35 by Huang Group (Burke, Timothy) (Filed on 7/19/2005) Modified on 7/20/2005 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/19/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 7/19/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Order GRANTING THE OKLAHOMA FIREFIGHTERS PENSION & RETIREMENT SYSTEM'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE ALL RELATED ACTIONS FOR ALL PURPOSES by OKLAHOMA FIREFIGHTERS PENSION & RETIREMENTS SYSTEM. (Green, Robert) (Filed on 7/19/2005) (Entered: 07/19/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 7/19/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of Counsel CERTIFICATE OF STUART L. BERMAN PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 3-7(d) by Robert S. Green on behalf of OKLAHOMA FIREFIGHTERS PENSION & RETIREMENTS SYSTEM (Green, Robert) (Filed on 7/19/2005) (Entered: 07/19/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Order re Geary Group Lead Plaintiff Motion by John W Geary, III. (Shingler, Arthur) (Filed on 7/18/2005) (Entered: 07/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Arthur Shingler in Support of Geary Group Lead Plaintiff Motion (Part 4) filed byJohn W Geary, III. (Shingler, Arthur) (Filed on 7/18/2005) (Entered: 07/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Arthur Shingler in Support of Geary Group Lead Plaintiff Motion filed byJohn W Geary, III. (Shingler, Arthur) (Filed on 7/18/2005) (Entered: 07/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Arthur Shingler in Support of Geary Group Lead Plaintiff Motion (Part 2) filed byJohn W Geary, III. (Shingler, Arthur) (Filed on 7/18/2005) (Entered: 07/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Arthur Shingler in Support of Geary Group Lead Plaintiff Motion (Part 1) filed byJohn W Geary, III. (Shingler, Arthur) (Filed on 7/18/2005) (Entered: 07/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Consolidate Cases and for Lead Plaintiff Appointment filed by John W Geary, III. Motion Hearing set for 8/26/2005 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Shingler, Arthur) (Filed on 7/18/2005) (Entered: 07/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by OKLAHOMA FIREFIGHTERS PENSION & RETIREMENTS SYSTEM re 62 , 63 , 64 , 65 , 66 , 67 , Notice of motion and motion to consolidate all related actions for all purposes ; Memorandum of points and authorities in support thereof and proposed Order. (Green, Robert) (Filed on 7/18/2005) Modified on 7/19/2005 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of Counsel CERTIFICATE OF ROBERT S. GREEN PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 3-7(d) by Robert S. Green on behalf of OKLAHOMA FIREFIGHTERS PENSION & RETIREMENTS SYSTEM (Green, Robert) (Filed on 7/18/2005) (Entered: 07/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of Counsel CERTIFICATE OF SEAN M. HANDLER PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 3-7(d) by Robert S. Green on behalf of OKLAHOMA FIREFIGHTERS PENSION & RETIREMENTS SYSTEM (Green, Robert) (Filed on 7/18/2005) (Entered: 07/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of Counsel CERTIFICATE OF ROBIN WINCHESTER PURUSANT TO LOCAL RULE 3-7(d) by Robert S. Green on behalf of OKLAHOMA FIREFIGHTERS PENSION & RETIREMENTS SYSTEM (Green, Robert) (Filed on 7/18/2005) (Entered: 07/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of ROBIN WINCHESTER in Support of 63 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) MOTION TO APPOINT THE OKLAHOMA FIREFIGHTERS PENSION & RETIREMENT SYSTEM AS LEAD PLAINTIFF PURSUANT TO SECTION 21D (a)(3)(B) OF THE SECURITIES EXCHANGE ACT OF 1934 AND TO APPROVE LEAD PLAINTIFF'S CHOICE OF COUNSEL filed byOKLAHOMA FIREFIGHTERS PENSION & RETIREMENTS SYSTEM. (Related document(s) 63 ) (Green, Robert) (Filed on 7/18/2005) (Entered: 07/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO APPOINT THE OKLAHOMA FIREFIGHTERS PENSION & RETIREMENT SYSTEM AS LEAD PLAINTIFF AND FOR APPOINTMENT OF LEAD COUNSEL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF by Prena Smajlaj (Green, Robert) (Filed on 7/18/2005) Modified on 7/19/2005 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Order APPOINTING THE OKLAHOMA FIREFIGHTERS PENSION & RETIREMENT SYSTEM AS LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPOINTING LEAD COUNSEL by Prena Smajlaj. (Green, Robert) (Filed on 7/18/2005) (Entered: 07/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            *** ERRONEOUS DOCKET ENTRY. *** MEMORANDUM in Support THE OKLAHOMA FIREFIGHTERS PENSION & RETIREMENT SYSTEMS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE ALL RELATED ACTIONS FOR ALL PURPOSES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed byPrena Smajlaj. (Green, Robert) (Filed on 7/18/2005) Modified on 7/19/2005 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 52 , 53 , 56 and 59 by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System (King, Laurence) (Filed on 7/18/2005) Modified on 7/19/2005 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Order Consolidating Related Actions, Appointing Lead Plaintiff and Approving Selection of Lead Counsel for the Class by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (King, Laurence) (Filed on 7/18/2005) (Entered: 07/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Giulio Cessario re 49 Certificate of Counsel,, 43 First MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel, 44 Memorandum in Support, 50 Certificate of Counsel,, 45 Declaration in Support, 46 Certificate of Counsel,, 51 Proposed Order, 47 Certificate of Counsel,, 48 Certificate of Counsel, (Braun, Michael) (Filed on 7/18/2005) (Entered: 07/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of Counsel re 29 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support Thereof, 30 Declaration in Support,, 31 Proposed Order, of Steven N. Williams, filed by Kelly L Bulawsky on behalf of City of Hialeah Employees' Retirement System (Bulawsky, Kelly) (Filed on 7/18/2005) (Entered: 07/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Laurence D. King in Support of 52 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed byArkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 52 ) (King, Laurence) (Filed on 7/18/2005) (Entered: 07/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of Counsel re 29 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support Thereof, 30 Declaration in Support,, 31 Proposed Order, by Kelly L Bulawsky on behalf of City of Hialeah Employees' Retirement System (Bulawsky, Kelly) (Filed on 7/18/2005) (Entered: 07/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of Counsel re 29 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support Thereof, 30 Declaration in Support,, 31 Proposed Order, of Joseph W. Cotchett, filed by Kelly L Bulawsky on behalf of City of Hialeah Employees' Retirement System (Bulawsky, Kelly) (Filed on 7/18/2005) (Entered: 07/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support re 52 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed byArkansas Public Employee Retirement System. (Related document(s) 52 ) (King, Laurence) (Filed on 7/18/2005) (Entered: 07/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel, MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Arkansas Public Employee Retirement System. Motion Hearing set for 8/26/2005 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (King, Laurence) (Filed on 7/18/2005) (Entered: 07/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Order Appointing Giulio Cessario As Lead Plaintiff and Approving His Selection of Lead Counsel by Giulio Cessario. (Braun, Michael) (Filed on 7/18/2005) (Entered: 07/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of Counsel re 45 Declaration in Support, 46 Certificate of Counsel,, 49 Certificate of Counsel,, 47 Certificate of Counsel,, 43 First MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel, 44 Memorandum in Support, 48 Certificate of Counsel, Certification of Nancy A. Kulesa Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) by Michael David Braun on behalf of Giulio Cessario (Braun, Michael) (Filed on 7/18/2005) (Entered: 07/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of Counsel re 45 Declaration in Support, 46 Certificate of Counsel,, 47 Certificate of Counsel,, 43 First MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel, 44 Memorandum in Support, 48 Certificate of Counsel, Certification of Jeffrey S. Nobel Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) by Michael David Braun on behalf of Giulio Cessario (Braun, Michael) (Filed on 7/18/2005) (Entered: 07/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of Counsel re 45 Declaration in Support, 46 Certificate of Counsel,, 47 Certificate of Counsel,, 43 First MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel, 44 Memorandum in Support Certification of Andrew M. Schatz Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) by Michael David Braun on behalf of Giulio Cessario (Braun, Michael) (Filed on 7/18/2005) (Entered: 07/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of Counsel re 45 Declaration in Support, 46 Certificate of Counsel,, 43 First MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel, 44 Memorandum in Support Certification of Marc L. Godino Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) by Michael David Braun on behalf of Giulio Cessario (Braun, Michael) (Filed on 7/18/2005) (Entered: 07/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of Counsel re 45 Declaration in Support, 43 First MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel, 44 Memorandum in Support Certification of Michael D. Braun Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) by Michael David Braun on behalf of Giulio Cessario (Braun, Michael) (Filed on 7/18/2005) (Entered: 07/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Michael D. Braun in Support of 43 First MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel, 44 Memorandum in Support filed byGiulio Cessario. (Related document(s) 43 , 44 ) (Braun, Michael) (Filed on 7/18/2005) (Entered: 07/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re 43 First MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed byGiulio Cessario. (Related document(s) 43 ) (Braun, Michael) (Filed on 7/18/2005) (Entered: 07/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                First MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Giulio Cessario. Motion Hearing set for 8/26/2005 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Braun, Michael) (Filed on 7/18/2005) (Entered: 07/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Order re 38 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel And for Consolidation of Related Actions by Intrepid Capital Management. (Goldberg, Michael) (Filed on 7/18/2005) (Entered: 07/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Intrepid Capital Management re 39 Memorandum in Support, 40 Declaration in Support,, 38 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel And for Consolidation of Related Actions (Goldberg, Michael) (Filed on 7/18/2005) (Entered: 07/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Michael Goldberg in Support of 39 Memorandum in Support, 38 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel And for Consolidation of Related Actions filed byIntrepid Capital Management. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C# 2 Exhibit D-E)(Related document(s) 39 , 38 ) (Goldberg, Michael) (Filed on 7/18/2005) (Entered: 07/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 38 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel And for Consolidation of Related Actions filed byIntrepid Capital Management. (Related document(s) 38 ) (Goldberg, Michael) (Filed on 7/18/2005) (Entered: 07/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel And for Consolidation of Related Actions filed by Intrepid Capital Management. Motion Hearing set for 8/19/2005 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Goldberg, Michael) (Filed on 7/18/2005) (Entered: 07/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of Counsel Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) by Patrice L. Bishop on behalf of Huang Group (Bishop, Patrice) (Filed on 7/18/2005) (Entered: 07/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of Counsel Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) by Timothy J. Burke on behalf of Huang Group (Burke, Timothy) (Filed on 7/18/2005) (Entered: 07/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                <