IN RE BROCADE COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS, INC. DERIVATIVE LITIGATION
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:05-cv-02233

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 2, 2017 at 4:49 AM DT (4.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Anjani K Jha, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Faruqi & Faruqi, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jacob A. Goldberg +1 215 277 5770 +1 215 277 5771 jgoldberg@faruqilaw.com
Space Christopher Marlborough +1 212 983 9330 +1 212 983 9331 cmarlborough@faruqilaw.com
Brocade Communications Systems, Inc. Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., Plaintiff
Officer/Director, Foundry Networks, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Dewey & LeBoeuf LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ann M Ashton +1 202 986 8000 +1 202 956 3214 amashton@dl.com
Space Ralph C. Ferrara +1 202 346 8020 +3468 346 346 8102 rferrara@dl.com
Space Lyle Roberts +1 202 346 8029 +1 202 346 8102 lroberts@dl.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kaye Scholer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barbara A. Caulfield +1 650 845 7000 +1 650 845 7333 bcaulfield@dl.com
Space Jonathan E. Richman +1 212 259 8000 jrichman@dl.com
Space Peter Edward Root +1 650 319 4506 +1 650 319 4906 peter.root@kayescholer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Arroyo LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian James Robbins +1 619 525 3990 +1 619 525 3991 brobbins@robbinsumeda.com
No Logo Mary E. Barbour, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bottini & Bottini, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Francis A. Bottini, Jr. +1 858 914 2001 +1 858 914 2002 fbottini@bottinilaw.com
No Logo Robert Galluscio, Plaintiff
No Logo Stephen Knee, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bramson, Plutzik, Mahler & Birkhaeuser LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alan Roth Plutzik +1 925 945 0200 +1 925 945 8792 aplutzik@bramsonplutzik.com
Space Kathryn Anne Schofield +1 415 400 3000 +1 415 400 3001 kschofield@bramsonplutzik.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Faruqi & Faruqi, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nadeem Faruqi +1 212 983 9330 +1 212 983 9331 nfaruqi@faruqilaw.com
Space Adam Richard Gonnelli +1 212 983 9330 +1 212 983 9331 agonnelli@faruqilaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Federman & Sherwood

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Bernard Federman +1 405 235 1560 +1 405 239 2112 wbf@federmanlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mary Alexander & Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mary E. Alexander +1 415 433 4440 +1 415 433 5440 malexander@maryalexanderlaw.com
No Logo William Pratt, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Federman & Sherwood

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sara E. Collier +1 405 235 1560 +1 405 239 2112 sec@federmanlaw.com
No Logo Neal Dempsey, Counter-Claimant
No Logo Seth D. Neiman, Counter-Claimant
v.
No Logo Antonio Canova, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Heller Ehrman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Colin Eugene Kelley +1 415 772 6289 colin.kelley@hellerehrman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan Lovells US LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman J Blears +1 650 463 4000 norman.blears@hoganlovells.com
Space Robin Eve Wechkin +1 425 222 0595 robin.wechkin@hoganlovells.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew C. Holohan +1 303 571 4000 +1 303 571 4321 mholohan@kilpatricktownsend.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul Hastings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alexander M.R. Lyon +1 650 320 1831 +1 650 320 1891 alexanderlyon@paulhastings.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Securities and Exchange Commission

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cameron Powers Hoffman +1 415 705 2455 HoffmanC@sec.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Guggenheim +1 415 493 3900 sguggenheim@wsgr.com
Space Caz Hashemi +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 CHASHEMI@WSGR.COM
Space Nina F. Locker +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 nlocker@wsgr.com
Space David Andrew McCarthy +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 493 6811 dmccarthy@wsgr.com
Brocade Communications Systems, Inc. Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Foundry Networks, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooley LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John C. Dwyer +1 650 843 5000 +1 650 849 7400 dwyerjc@cooley.com
Space James M. Penning +1 650 843 5000 +1 650 857 0663 jpenning@cooley.com
Space Jessica Valenzuela Santamaria +1 650 843 5000 +1 650 849 7400 jsantamaria@cooley.com
Space Benjamin Daniel Singerman +1 650 843 5000 +1 650 857 0663 bsingerman@cooley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Grant P. Fondo +1 650 752 3100 +1 650 853 1038 gfondo@goodwinlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kaye Scholer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen Christopher Holmes +1 650 319 4501 +1 650 319 4901 stephen.holmes@kayescholer.com
No Logo Christopher B. Paisley, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Shearman & Sterling LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen D. Hibbard +1 415 616 1100 +1 415 616 1199 shibbard@shearman.com
No Logo David L. House, Defendant
No Logo Gregory L. Reyes, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bird, Marella, Boxer, Wolpert, Nessim, Drooks & Lincenberg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Terry W Bird +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 twb@birdmarella.com
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder psc@birdmarella.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Proskauer Rose LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Navid Yadegar +1 310 499 0140 +1 888 667 9576 navid@ymsllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jack Patrick DiCanio +1 650 470 4660 +1 650 798 3550 jdicanio@skadden.com
Space Richard Marmaro +1 213 687 5480 +1 213 687 5600 Richard.Marmaro@skadden.com
Space Garrett J. Waltzer +1 650 470 4540 +1 650 470 4570 gwaltzer@skadden.com
No Logo Jack Cuthbert, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark E Beck +1 213 629 2020 mbeck@orrick.com
Space Anthony A De Corso +1 213 629 2020 adecorso@orrick.com
Space Eric A Gressler +1 213 629 2020 egressler@orrick.com
No Logo Kmpg Llp, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Geoffrey M. Ezgar +1 650 590 0700 +1 650 590 1900 gezgar@kslaw.com
No Logo L. William Krause, Defendant
No Logo Mark Leslie, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Farella Braun & Martel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Koren Nall +1 415 954 4400 +1 415 954 4480 jnall@fbm.com
Space Douglas Rea Young +1 415 954 4400 +1 415 954 4480 dyoung@fbm.com
No Logo Michael J. Byrd, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by James N. Esterkin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Josh Alan Cohen +1 415 749 1800 +1 415 749 1694 jcohen@clarencedyer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick C. Doolittle +1 415 875 6600 +1 415 875 6700 patrickdoolittle@quinnemanuel.com
Space John Mark Potter +1 415 875 6600 +4 158 756 7600 johnpotter@quinnemanuel.com
No Logo Michael Klayko, Defendant
No Logo Neal Dempsey, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by AT&T Services, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ramiz I. Rafeedie +1 415 778 1465 +1 415 543 0818 ramiz.rafeedie@att.com

Toggle Switch Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey L. Bornstein +1 415 249 1000 +1 415 249 1001 jeff.bornstein@klgates.com
Space Leah Gabriana Shough +1 415 882 8200 leah.shough@klgates.com
No Logo Nicholas G. Moore, Defendant
No Logo Paul R. Bonderson, Jr., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Shartsis Friese LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jason Pang Fe Lee +1 415 421 6500 +1 415 421 2922 jlee@sflaw.com
Space Robert Charles Friese +1 415 421 6500 rfriese@sflaw.com
Space Jahan Pierre Raissi +1 415 421 6500 jraissi@sflaw.com
No Logo Robert D. Bossi, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Walter F. Brown +1 415 773 5700 +1 415 773 5759 wbrown@orrick.com
Space Stephen M Knaster +1 415 773 5700 sknaster@orrick.com
Space Ruth Young Kwon +1 415 773 5700 +1 415 773 5759 rkwon@orrick.com
Space Justyna W. Lee +1 415 773 5877 +1 415 773 5759 jlee@orrick.com
Space Amy M. Ross +1 415 773 5700 +1 415 773 5759 aross@orrick.com
Space Michael David Torpey +1 415 773 5700 +1 415 773 5759 mtorpey@orrick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ramsey & Ehrlich LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Miles F. Ehrlich +1 510 548 3600 +1 510 291 3060 miles@ramsey-ehrlich.com
No Logo Robert R. Walker, Defendant
No Logo Sanjay Vaswani, Defendant
No Logo Seth D. Neiman, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky & Popeo, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan A. Shapiro +1 617 526 6000 +1 617 526 5000 JAShapiro@mintz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael A Mugmon +1 650 858 6000 +1 650 858 6100 michael.mugmon@wilmerhale.com
Space Jeffrey B. Rudman +1 617 526 6912 +1 617 526 5000 jeffrey.rudman@wilmerhale.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Crystal Mothershead Gaudette +1 650 493 9300 cgaudette@wsgr.com
Space Christopher R. Howald +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 565 5100 chowald@wsgr.com
Space Mark Thomas Oakes +1 650 493 9300 +1 650 493 6811 moakes@wsgr.com
No Logo Stephanie Jensen, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael D. Celio +1 415 773 6613 +1 415 397 7188 mcelio@keker.com
Space Jan Nielsen Little +1 415 391 5400 +1 415 397 7188 jlittle@kvn.com
Space Steven Paul Ragland +1 415 391 5400 +1 415 397 7188 sragland@kvn.com
Brocade Communications Systems, Inc. Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., Counter-Defendant
Officer/Director, Foundry Networks, Inc.
No Logo Neal Dempsey, Counter-Defendant
PriceWaterhouseCoopers LLP PriceWaterhouseCoopers LLP, Movant
PriceWaterhouseCoopers LLP PriceWaterhouseCoopers LLP, Third Party Defendant
No Logo Special Master Futures Representative, Arbitrator
  Entries (469) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 469 Filed: 2/3/2010, Entered: 2/3/2010 Court Filing
ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF REMAINING CLAIMS AGAINST GREGORY REYES PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT re 468 Stipulation filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/2/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2010)
    LREF
    Blank 468 Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: None
    STIPULATION STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER RE: DISMISSAL OF REMAINING CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANT GREGORY L. REYES PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Root, Peter) (Filed on 2/1/2010) (Entered: 02/01/2010)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 467 Filed: 12/21/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 455 Motion (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2009) (Entered: 12/21/2009)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 466 Filed: 12/12/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
        Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/4/09, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, CRR, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/9/2010. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 12/12/2009) (Entered: 12/12/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 465 Filed: 12/4/2009, Entered: None
          Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 12/4/2009 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 12/4/2009) re 455 MOTION Partial Lifting of Stay and Approval of Settlement and Entry of Complete Bar Order NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PARTIAL LIFTING OF STAY AND FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AND ENTRY OF COMPLETE BAR ORDER AS TO DEFENDANT GREGORY L. REYES filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan.) (be, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/4/2009) (Entered: 12/07/2009)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 464 Filed: 11/17/2009, Entered: None
            Reply Memorandum REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF 455 MOTION FOR PARTIAL LIFTING OF STAY AND FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AND ENTRY OF COMPLETE BAR ORDER AS TO DEFENDANT GREGORY L. REYES filed byBrocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Root, Peter) (Filed on 11/17/2009) Modified on 11/18/2009 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/17/2009)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 463 Filed: 11/12/2009, Entered: None
              NOTICE of Change of Address by Francis A. Bottini, Jr (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Bottini, Francis) (Filed on 11/12/2009) (Entered: 11/12/2009)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank 462 Filed: 10/30/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER AND ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT re Dismissal of Remaining Claims against Neal Dempsey and Seth Neiman and their prospective counterclaimes re 460 Stipulation, filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/29/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2009) Modified on 11/2/2009 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/30/2009)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 461 Filed: 10/30/2009, Entered: None
                  Declaration of PETER E. ROOT in Support of 459 Proposed Order,, 455 MOTION Partial Lifting of Stay and Approval of Settlement and Entry of Complete Bar Order NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PARTIAL LIFTING OF STAY AND FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AND ENTRY OF COMPLETE BAR ORDER AS TO DEFENDANT GREGORY L. REYES, 458 Proposed Order,, 457 Declaration in Support,, 456 Declaration in Support,, SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF PETER E. ROOT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT WITH DEFENDANT GREGORY L. REYES filed byBrocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Related document(s) 459 , 455 , 458 , 457 , 456 ) (Root, Peter) (Filed on 10/30/2009) (Entered: 10/30/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank 460 Filed: 10/28/2009, Entered: None
                    STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER AND ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 54(b) RE: DISMISSAL OF REMAINING CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANTS NEAL DEMPSEY AND SETH D. NEIMAN AND THEIR RESPECTIVE COUNTERCLAIMS PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENTS by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Root, Peter) (Filed on 10/28/2009) (Entered: 10/28/2009)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 459 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None
                      Proposed Order re 455 MOTION Partial Lifting of Stay and Approval of Settlement and Entry of Complete Bar Order NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PARTIAL LIFTING OF STAY AND FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AND ENTRY OF COMPLETE BAR ORDER AS TO DEFENDANT GREGORY L. REYES, 458 Proposed Order,, 457 Declaration in Support,, 456 Declaration in Support,, [PROPOSED] ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND ENTRY OF COMPLETE BAR ORDER AS TO DEFENDANT GREGORY L. REYES by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Root, Peter) (Filed on 10/9/2009) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 458 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None
                        Proposed Order re 455 MOTION Partial Lifting of Stay and Approval of Settlement and Entry of Complete Bar Order NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PARTIAL LIFTING OF STAY AND FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AND ENTRY OF COMPLETE BAR ORDER AS TO DEFENDANT GREGORY L. REYES, 457 Declaration in Support,, 456 Declaration in Support,, [PROPOSED] ORDER LIFTING STAY FOR LIMITED PURPOSES OF APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND ENTERING BAR ORDER AS TO DEFENDANT GREGORY L. REYES by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Root, Peter) (Filed on 10/9/2009) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 457 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None
                          Declaration of PETER E. ROOT in Support of 455 MOTION Partial Lifting of Stay and Approval of Settlement and Entry of Complete Bar Order NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PARTIAL LIFTING OF STAY AND FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AND ENTRY OF COMPLETE BAR ORDER AS TO DEFENDANT GREGORY L. REYES, 456 Declaration in Support,, DECLARATION OF PETER E. ROOT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT WITH DEFENDANT GREGORY L. REYES filed byBrocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 455 , 456 ) (Root, Peter) (Filed on 10/9/2009) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 456 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None
                            Declaration of SPECIAL LITIGATION COMMITTEE MEMBERS in Support of 455 MOTION Partial Lifting of Stay and Approval of Settlement and Entry of Complete Bar Order NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PARTIAL LIFTING OF STAY AND FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AND ENTRY OF COMPLETE BAR ORDER AS TO DEFENDANT GREGORY L. REYES DECLARATION OF SPECIAL LITIGATION COMMITTEE MEMBERS IN SUPPORT OF SETTLEMENT WITH DEFENDANT GREGORY REYES filed byBrocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Related document(s) 455 ) (Root, Peter) (Filed on 10/9/2009) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank 455 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None
                              MOTION Partial Lifting of Stay and Approval of Settlement and Entry of Complete Bar Order NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PARTIAL LIFTING OF STAY AND FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AND ENTRY OF COMPLETE BAR ORDER AS TO DEFENDANT GREGORY L. REYES filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/4/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Root, Peter) (Filed on 10/9/2009) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 454 Filed: 8/7/2009, Entered: None
                                NOTICE of Change of Address by Marc M. Umeda (Umeda, Marc) (Filed on 8/7/2009) (Entered: 08/07/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 453 Filed: 7/17/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER Approving Settlement and Entry of Complete Bar Order as to Seth D. Neiman re 443 MOTION for Settlement.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/16/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2009) (Entered: 07/17/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 452 Filed: 7/17/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer Approving Settlement and Entry of Complete Bar Order as to Neal Dempsey 443 Motion for Settlement (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2009) (Entered: 07/17/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 451 Filed: 7/17/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER PARTIALLY LIFTING STAY. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/16/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2009) (Entered: 07/17/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 450 Filed: 7/14/2009, Entered: None
                                        Reply Memorandum re 443 MOTION for Settlement NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF PLAINTIFF FOR PARTIAL LIFTING OF STAY AND FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENTS AND ENTRY OF COMPLETE BAR ORDERS AS TO DEFENDANTS NEAL DEMPSEY AND SETH D. NEIMAN REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENTS AND COMPLETE BAR ORDERS AS TO DEFENDANTS NEAL DEMPSEY AND SETH D. NEIMAN filed byBrocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Root, Peter) (Filed on 7/14/2009) (Entered: 07/14/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 449 Filed: 6/25/2009, Entered: None
                                          Statement re 443 MOTION for Settlement NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF PLAINTIFF FOR PARTIAL LIFTING OF STAY AND FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENTS AND ENTRY OF COMPLETE BAR ORDERS AS TO DEFENDANTS NEAL DEMPSEY AND SETH D. NEIMAN . STATEMENT OF DEFENDANTS NEAL DEMPSEY AND SETH D. NEIMAN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AND ENTRY OF BAR ORDER by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc. (Root, Peter) (Filed on 6/25/2009) Modified on 6/29/2009 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/25/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 448 Filed: 6/25/2009, Entered: None
                                            Proposed Order re 445 Declaration in Support,, 443 MOTION for Settlement NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF PLAINTIFF FOR PARTIAL LIFTING OF STAY AND FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENTS AND ENTRY OF COMPLETE BAR ORDERS AS TO DEFENDANTS NEAL DEMPSEY AND SETH D. NEIMAN, 447 Proposed Order,, 444 Declaration in Support,, 446 Proposed Order, [PROPOSED] ORDER PARTIALLY LIFTING STAY by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Root, Peter) (Filed on 6/25/2009) (Entered: 06/25/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 447 Filed: 6/25/2009, Entered: None
                                              Proposed Order re 445 Declaration in Support,, 443 MOTION for Settlement NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF PLAINTIFF FOR PARTIAL LIFTING OF STAY AND FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENTS AND ENTRY OF COMPLETE BAR ORDERS AS TO DEFENDANTS NEAL DEMPSEY AND SETH D. NEIMAN, 444 Declaration in Support,, 446 Proposed Order, [PROPOSED] ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND ENTRY OF COMPLETE BAR ORDER AS TO DEFENDANT SETH D. NEIMAN by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Root, Peter) (Filed on 6/25/2009) (Entered: 06/25/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 446 Filed: 6/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                Proposed Order re 445 Declaration in Support,, 443 MOTION for Settlement NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF PLAINTIFF FOR PARTIAL LIFTING OF STAY AND FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENTS AND ENTRY OF COMPLETE BAR ORDERS AS TO DEFENDANTS NEAL DEMPSEY AND SETH D. NEIMAN, 444 Declaration in Support,, [PROPOSED] ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND ENTRY OF COMPLETE BAR ORDER AS TO DEFENDANT NEAL DEMPSEY by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Root, Peter) (Filed on 6/25/2009) (Entered: 06/25/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 445 Filed: 6/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                  Declaration of PETER E. ROOT in Support of 443 MOTION for Settlement NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF PLAINTIFF FOR PARTIAL LIFTING OF STAY AND FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENTS AND ENTRY OF COMPLETE BAR ORDERS AS TO DEFENDANTS NEAL DEMPSEY AND SETH D. NEIMAN, 444 Declaration in Support,, DECLARATION OF PETER E. ROOT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENTS AND ENTRY OF COMPLETE BAR ORDERS AS TO DEFENDANTS NEAL DEMPSEY AND SETH D. NEIMAN filed byBrocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Related document(s) 443 , 444 ) (Root, Peter) (Filed on 6/25/2009) (Entered: 06/25/2009)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 444 Filed: 6/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                    Declaration of SPECIAL LITIGATION COMMITTEE in Support of 443 MOTION for Settlement NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF PLAINTIFF FOR PARTIAL LIFTING OF STAY AND FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENTS AND ENTRY OF COMPLETE BAR ORDERS AS TO DEFENDANTS NEAL DEMPSEY AND SETH D. NEIMAN DECLARATION OF SPECIAL LITIGATION COMMITTEE IN SUPPORT OF SETTLEMENTS WITH DEFENDANTS NEAL DEMPSEY AND SETH D. NEIMAN filed byBrocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Related document(s) 443 ) (Root, Peter) (Filed on 6/25/2009) (Entered: 06/25/2009)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Blank 443 Filed: 6/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                      MOTION for Settlement NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF PLAINTIFF FOR PARTIAL LIFTING OF STAY AND FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENTS AND ENTRY OF COMPLETE BAR ORDERS AS TO DEFENDANTS NEAL DEMPSEY AND SETH D. NEIMAN filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/24/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Root, Peter) (Filed on 6/25/2009) (Entered: 06/25/2009)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 442 Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        Transcript of Proceedings held on March 13, 2009, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Sullivan, CSR, CRR, Telephone number 415-794-6659. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/23/2009. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 4/27/2009) (Entered: 04/27/2009)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 441 Filed: 4/14/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ORDER RE: Dismissal of remaining claims against defendant Antonio Canova re 440 Stipulation filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/13/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2009) (Entered: 04/14/2009)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 440 Filed: 4/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                            STIPULATION STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER RE: DISMISSAL OF REMAINING CLAIMS AGAINST CANOVA PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Root, Peter) (Filed on 4/9/2009) (Entered: 04/09/2009)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 439 Filed: 3/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE of Change of Address by Norman J. Blears NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ADDRESS (Blears, Norman) (Filed on 3/31/2009) (Entered: 03/31/2009)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 421 Motion for Attorney Fees and reimbursement of expenses (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2009) (Entered: 03/27/2009)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 437 Filed: 3/26/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER re Dismissal of remaining claim against defendant Robert D. Bossi re 436 Stipulation filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/25/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2009) (Entered: 03/26/2009)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 436 Filed: 3/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                    STIPULATION STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: DISMISSAL OF REMAINING CLAIM AGAINST DEFENDANT ROBERT D. BOSSI by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Root, Peter) (Filed on 3/24/2009) (Entered: 03/24/2009)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 435 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 402 Motion for Settlement (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2009) (Entered: 03/13/2009)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 434 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 393 Motion for Settlement (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2009) (Entered: 03/13/2009)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                          Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 3/13/2009 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 3/13/2009) re 393 MOTION for Settlement NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF PLAINTIFF FOR GOOD-FAITH SETTLEMENT DETERMINATION AS TO DEFENDANT ROBERT D. BOSSI filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., 402 MOTION for Settlement NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF PLAINTIFF FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AND ENTRY OF COMPLETE BAR ORDER AS TO DEFENDANT ANTONIO CANOVA filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan.) (be, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/13/2009) (Entered: 03/13/2009)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 3/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                            Brief re 421 Consent MOTION for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses PLAINTIFF BROCADE COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS, INC.'S SUBMISSION IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' FEE APPLICATION filed byBrocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Related document(s) 421 ) (Root, Peter) (Filed on 3/11/2009) (Entered: 03/11/2009)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                              Reply Memorandum re 402 MOTION for Settlement NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF PLAINTIFF FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AND ENTRY OF COMPLETE BAR ORDER AS TO DEFENDANT ANTONIO CANOVA REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AND COMPLETE BAR ORDER AS TO DEFENDANT ANTONIO CANOVA filed byBrocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Root, Peter) (Filed on 2/27/2009) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                Reply Memorandum re 393 MOTION for Settlement NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF PLAINTIFF FOR GOOD-FAITH SETTLEMENT DETERMINATION AS TO DEFENDANT ROBERT D. BOSSI REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR GOOD-FAITH SETTLEMENT AS TO DEFENDANT ROBERT D. BOSSI filed byBrocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Root, Peter) (Filed on 2/27/2009) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 429 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER REFERRING CASE to Arbitration. Charles B. Renfrew (Ret.) chair of a three member arbitration panel. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/26/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2009) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 2/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                    ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM BROCADE'S ANSWER TO 387 COUNTERCLAIMS ASSERTED BY DEFENDANT AND COUNTERCLAIM-PLAINTIFF SETH NEIMAN byBrocade Communications Systems, Inc. (Root, Peter) (Filed on 2/26/2009) Modified on 2/27/2009 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/26/2009)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 2/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                      ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM BROCADE'S ANSWER TO 383 COUNTERCLAIMS ASSERTED BY DEFENDANT AND COUNTERCLAIM-PLAINTIFF NEAL DEMPSEY byBrocade Communications Systems, Inc. (Root, Peter) (Filed on 2/26/2009) Modified on 2/27/2009 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/26/2009)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 2/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                        STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Referring Action to Binding Arbitration by Neal Dempsey. (Bornstein, Jeffrey) (Filed on 2/26/2009) (Entered: 02/26/2009)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 2/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                          Proposed Order re 421 Consent MOTION for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses by Anjani K Jha, William Pratt. (Marlborough, Christopher) (Filed on 2/26/2009) (Entered: 02/26/2009)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 2/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                            Declaration of William B. Federman in Support of 421 Consent MOTION for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses filed byAnjani K Jha, William Pratt. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 421 ) (Marlborough, Christopher) (Filed on 2/26/2009) (Entered: 02/26/2009)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 2/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                              Declaration of Adam Gonnelli in Support of 421 Consent MOTION for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses filed byAnjani K Jha, William Pratt. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 421 ) (Marlborough, Christopher) (Filed on 2/26/2009) (Entered: 02/26/2009)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 422 Filed: 2/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                Brief re 421 Consent MOTION for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses filed byAnjani K Jha, William Pratt. (Related document(s) 421 ) (Marlborough, Christopher) (Filed on 2/26/2009) (Entered: 02/26/2009)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 421 Filed: 2/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Consent MOTION for Attorney Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses filed by Anjani K Jha, William Pratt. Motion Hearing set for 4/3/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Marlborough, Christopher) (Filed on 2/26/2009) (Entered: 02/26/2009)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 420 Filed: 2/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Declaration of Antonio Canova regarding plaintiff's motion for approval of settlement and entry of complete bar order filed byAntonio Canova. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2009) (Entered: 02/25/2009)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 414 Motion to Seal (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2009) (Entered: 02/24/2009)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 418 Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                        ASSOCIATION of Counsel Notice of Association of Counsel by Gregory L. Reyes. (Marmaro, Richard) (Filed on 2/24/2009) (Entered: 02/24/2009)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 417 Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Antonio Canova re Declaration of Antonio Canova submitted under seal (Blears, Norman) (Filed on 2/24/2009) (Entered: 02/24/2009)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 416 Filed: 2/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Proposed Order re 414 MOTION to Seal Defendant Antonio Canova's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Approval of Settlement and Entry of Complete Bar by Antonio Canova. (Blears, Norman) (Filed on 2/23/2009) (Entered: 02/23/2009)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 2/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Declaration of Norman J. Blears in Support of 414 MOTION to Seal Defendant Antonio Canova's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Approval of Settlement and Entry of Complete Bar filed byAntonio Canova. (Related document(s) 414 ) (Blears, Norman) (Filed on 2/23/2009) (Entered: 02/23/2009)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 414 Filed: 2/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                MOTION to Seal Defendant Antonio Canova's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Approval of Settlement and Entry of Complete Bar filed by Antonio Canova. (Blears, Norman) (Filed on 2/23/2009) (Entered: 02/23/2009)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 413 Filed: 2/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Antonio Canova Manual Filing Notification of Defendant Antonio Canova's Declaration Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Approval of Settlement and Entry of Complete Bar Order as to Antonio Canova (Blears, Norman) (Filed on 2/23/2009) (Entered: 02/23/2009)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 412 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER Extending Deadline to Respond re 411 Stipulation filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. Signed by Judge Charles on 2/12/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2009) (Entered: 02/13/2009)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 411 Filed: 2/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      STIPULATION STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFF TO RESPOND TO COUNTERCLAIMS by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Root, Peter) (Filed on 2/12/2009) (Entered: 02/12/2009)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410 Filed: 2/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Declaration of Robert Bossi in Support of 393 MOTION for Settlement NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF PLAINTIFF FOR GOOD-FAITH SETTLEMENT DETERMINATION AS TO DEFENDANT ROBERT D. BOSSI filed byRobert D. Bossi. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (Related document(s) 393 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2009) (Entered: 02/09/2009)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 399 Motion to Seal (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2009) (Entered: 02/06/2009)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 408 Filed: 2/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            ERRATA re 402 MOTION for Settlement NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF PLAINTIFF FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AND ENTRY OF COMPLETE BAR ORDER AS TO DEFENDANT ANTONIO CANOVA NOTICE OF ERRATA by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Root, Peter) (Filed on 2/5/2009) (Entered: 02/05/2009)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 2/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Robert D. Bossi re 398 Notice (Other), 393 MOTION for Settlement NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF PLAINTIFF FOR GOOD-FAITH SETTLEMENT DETERMINATION AS TO DEFENDANT ROBERT D. BOSSI, 401 Proposed Order, 396 Proposed Order, 394 Declaration in Support, 395 Declaration in Support, 399 MOTION to Seal DEFENDANT ROBERT BOSSI'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL ROBERT BOSSI'S DECLARATION REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT DETERMINATION, 400 Declaration in Support, Declaration of Mailing By Certified Mail (Ehrlich, Miles) (Filed on 2/4/2009) (Entered: 02/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406 Filed: 2/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Robert D. Bossi re Declaration of Robert Bossi submitted under seal. (Ehrlich, Miles) (Filed on 2/4/2009) Modified on 2/5/2009 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 2/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Proposed Order re 402 MOTION for Settlement NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF PLAINTIFF FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AND ENTRY OF COMPLETE BAR ORDER AS TO DEFENDANT ANTONIO CANOVA, [PROPOSED] ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND ENTRY OF COMPLETE BAR ORDER by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc. (Root, Peter) (Filed on 2/3/2009) Modified on 2/4/2009 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 2/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Declaration of SPECIAL LITIGATION COMMITTEE MEMBERS in Support of 403 Declaration in Support, 402 MOTION for Settlement NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF PLAINTIFF FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AND ENTRY OF COMPLETE BAR ORDER AS TO DEFENDANT ANTONIO CANOVA DECLARATION OF SPECIAL LITIGATION COMMITTEE MEMBERS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AND ENTRY OF COMPLETE BAR ORDER AS TO DEFENDANT ANTONIO CANOVA filed byBrocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Related document(s) 403 , 402 ) (Root, Peter) (Filed on 2/3/2009) (Entered: 02/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 2/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Declaration of PETER E. ROOT in Support of 402 MOTION for Settlement NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF PLAINTIFF FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AND ENTRY OF COMPLETE BAR ORDER AS TO DEFENDANT ANTONIO CANOVA DECLARATION OF PETER E. ROOT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AND ENTRY OF COMPLETE BAR ORDER AS TO DEFENDANT ANTONIO CANOVA filed byBrocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Related document(s) 402 ) (Root, Peter) (Filed on 2/3/2009) (Entered: 02/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 2/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Settlement NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF PLAINTIFF FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AND ENTRY OF COMPLETE BAR ORDER AS TO DEFENDANT ANTONIO CANOVA filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/13/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Root, Peter) (Filed on 2/3/2009) (Entered: 02/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 2/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Proposed Order re 399 MOTION to Seal DEFENDANT ROBERT BOSSI'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL ROBERT BOSSI'S DECLARATION REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT DETERMINATION by Robert D. Bossi. (Ehrlich, Miles) (Filed on 2/3/2009) (Entered: 02/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 2/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Declaration of MILES EHRLICH in Support of 399 MOTION to Seal DEFENDANT ROBERT BOSSI'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL ROBERT BOSSI'S DECLARATION REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT DETERMINATION filed byRobert D. Bossi. (Related document(s) 399 ) (Ehrlich, Miles) (Filed on 2/3/2009) (Entered: 02/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 2/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Seal DEFENDANT ROBERT BOSSI'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL ROBERT BOSSI'S DECLARATION REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT DETERMINATION filed by Robert D. Bossi. (Ehrlich, Miles) (Filed on 2/3/2009) (Entered: 02/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 2/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Robert D. Bossi MANUAL FILING NOTIFICATION OF DEFENDANT ROBERT BOSSI'S DECLARATION REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT DETERMINATION (Ehrlich, Miles) (Filed on 2/3/2009) (Entered: 02/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 2/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Miles F. Ehrlich (Ehrlich, Miles) (Filed on 2/3/2009) (Entered: 02/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 2/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Order re 393 MOTION for Settlement NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF PLAINTIFF FOR GOOD-FAITH SETTLEMENT DETERMINATION AS TO DEFENDANT ROBERT D. BOSSI, [PROPOSED] ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc. (Root, Peter) (Filed on 2/3/2009) Modified on 2/4/2009 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 2/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of ANN M. ASHTON in Support of 393 MOTION for Settlement NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF PLAINTIFF FOR GOOD-FAITH SETTLEMENT DETERMINATION AS TO DEFENDANT ROBERT D. BOSSI, 394 Declaration in Support, DECLARATION OF ANN M. ASHTON IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT DETERMINATION filed byBrocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Related document(s) 393 , 394 ) (Root, Peter) (Filed on 2/3/2009) (Entered: 02/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 2/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of SPECIAL LITIGATION COMMITTEE MEMBERS in Support of 393 MOTION for Settlement NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF PLAINTIFF FOR GOOD-FAITH SETTLEMENT DETERMINATION AS TO DEFENDANT ROBERT D. BOSSI DECLARATION OF SPECIAL LITIGATION COMMITTEE MEMBERS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT DETERMINATION AS TO DEFENDANT ROBERT D. BOSSI filed byBrocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Related document(s) 393 ) (Root, Peter) (Filed on 2/3/2009) (Entered: 02/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 2/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Settlement NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF PLAINTIFF FOR GOOD-FAITH SETTLEMENT DETERMINATION AS TO DEFENDANT ROBERT D. BOSSI filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/13/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Root, Peter) (Filed on 2/3/2009) (Entered: 02/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 2/3/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER extending time to file third-party complaint without obtaining leave by motion re 390 Stipulation filed by Gregory L. Reyes. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/3/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2009) (Entered: 02/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 2/3/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER suspending deadline re 389 Stipulation filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/02/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2009) (Entered: 02/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 2/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Extending Time for Gregory L. Reyes to File Third-Party Complaint Without Obtaining Leave by Motion by Gregory L. Reyes. (Marmaro, Richard) (Filed on 2/2/2009) (Entered: 02/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION re 388 Order STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER SUSPENDING DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT ROBERT D. BOSSI TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Root, Peter) (Filed on 1/30/2009) (Entered: 01/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 1/28/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER extending time to respond to complaint re 384 Stipulation filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/28/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2009) (Entered: 01/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      DEFENDANT SETH D. NEIMAN'S ANSWER to Amended Complaint AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, COUNTERCLAIM against Brocade Communications Systems, Inc. bySeth D. Neiman. (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 1/23/2009) (Entered: 01/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Amended Complaint Defendant Antonio Canova's Answer to Second Amended Complaint byAntonio Canova. (Blears, Norman) (Filed on 1/23/2009) (Entered: 01/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Amended Complaint [ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF GREGORY L. REYES TO BROCADE COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS, INC.'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT] byGregory L. Reyes. (Marmaro, Richard) (Filed on 1/23/2009) (Entered: 01/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR ROBERT D. BOSSI TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Root, Peter) (Filed on 1/23/2009) (Entered: 01/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Amended Complaint[Answer of Neal Dempsey to the Second Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Neal Dempsey] byNeal Dempsey. (Bornstein, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/23/2009) Modified on 1/26/2009 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATED SCHEDULING ORDER re 381 Stipulation filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/16/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2009) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 1/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION re 379 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting, 380 Declaration in Support, STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] SCHEDULING ORDER by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Root, Peter) (Filed on 1/15/2009) (Entered: 01/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 1/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of PETER E. ROOT in Support of 379 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting DECLARATION OF PETER E. ROOT IN CONNECTION WITH JOINT REPORT FOLLOWING RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE filed byBrocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Related document(s) 379 ) (Root, Peter) (Filed on 1/15/2009) (Entered: 01/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 1/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting JOINT REPORT FOLLOWING RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE. (Root, Peter) (Filed on 1/15/2009) (Entered: 01/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 1/7/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER extending time limit to answer second amended complaint re 376 Stipulation filed by Seth D. Neiman. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/6/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2009) (Entered: 01/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 1/6/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Breyer granting 299 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 303 Motion to Dismiss; granting 304 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 308 Motion to Dismiss; granting 312 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 313 Motion to Dismiss; granting 320 Motion to Dismiss; granting 323 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 326 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 329 Motion to Dismiss (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2009) (Entered: 01/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 12/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME LIMIT TO ANSWER SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Seth D. Neiman. (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 12/23/2008) (Entered: 12/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER memorandum on motions to dismiss (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2008) (Entered: 12/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                Transcript of Proceedings held on December 5, 2008, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter/Transcriber Belle Ball, CSR, RMR, CRR, Telephone number (415)373-2529. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/9/2009. (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 12/12/2008) (Entered: 12/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Antonio Canova Defendant Antonio Canova's Notice of Subsequent Authority (Blears, Norman) (Filed on 12/11/2008) (Entered: 12/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 12/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 12/5/2008 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 12/5/2008) re 323 MOTION to Dismiss Special Litigation Committee's Second Amended Complaint filed by Mark Leslie, 301 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint filed by Antonio Canova, 312 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Michael J. Byrd, 326 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Seth D. Neiman, 304 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Stephanie Jensen, 303 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 301 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 301 filed by Antonio Canova, 320 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rules 9(b) and 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rules 9(b) and 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure filed by Paul R. Bonderson, Jr., 313 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Neal Dempsey, 329 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint [DEFENDANT GREGORY L. REYES' MOTION TO DISMISS BROCADE COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS, INC.'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT] MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint [DEFENDANT GREGORY L. REYES' MOTION TO DISMISS BROCADE COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS, INC.'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT] filed by Gregory L. Reyes, 308 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT ROBERT D. BOSSI'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed by Robert D. Bossi. (Court Reporter Belle Ball.) (be, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/5/2008) (Entered: 12/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 12/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ERRATA re 360 Reply Memorandum NOTICE OF ERRATA RE: DEFENDANT MARK LESLIE'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS by Mark Leslie. (Attachments: # 1 Errata Amended Reply Brief of Defendant Mark Leslie in Support of Motion to DIsmiss)(Nall, Jessica) (Filed on 12/1/2008) (Entered: 12/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 12/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Jack Cuthbert re 299 MOTION to Dismiss The Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 9(b) and 12(b)(6); Memorandum of Points and Authorties in Support Thereof MOTION to Dismiss The Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 9(b) and 12(b)(6); Memorandum of Points and Authorties in Support Thereof -- PROPOSED Notice of Ruling on Defendant Jack Cuthbert's Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint (De Corso, Anthony) (Filed on 12/1/2008) (Entered: 12/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 11/25/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 365 Motion for leave to file memorandum in excess of 15 pages (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2008) (Entered: 11/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 11/25/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyery granting 353 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2008) (Entered: 11/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 11/25/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 344 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Responses due by 11/24/2008. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2008) (Entered: 11/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 11/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion Defendant Neal Dempsey's Reply Brief in Support of 313 Motion to Dismiss filed byNeal Dempsey. (Bornstein, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/24/2008) Modified on 11/26/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 11/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION DEFENDANT SETH D. NEIMAN'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MEMORANDUM OF POINTS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 11/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Order re Motion for leave to file in excess of 15 pages by Seth D. Neiman. (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 11/22/2008) Modified on 11/25/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 11/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Michael A. Mugmon in support of Motion for leave to file in excess of 15 pages filed by Seth D. Neiman. (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 11/22/2008) Modified on 11/25/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Reply to Opposition re 326 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Defendant Seth D. Neiman's Reply in Support of His Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed bySeth D. Neiman. (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 11/21/2008) (Entered: 11/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Reply to Opposition [DEFENDANT GREGORY L. REYES' REPLY TO 340 BROCADE'S OMNIBUS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT] filed byGregory L. Reyes. (Marmaro, Richard) (Filed on 11/21/2008) Modified on 11/25/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Reply Memorandum in Support of 323 Motion to Dismiss filed byMark Leslie. (Young, Douglas) (Filed on 11/21/2008) Modified on 11/25/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joinder to Director Defendants Reply Briefs filed by Neal Dempsey. (Rafeedie, Ramiz) (Filed on 11/21/2008) (Entered: 11/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Appendix re 356 Reply Memorandum of Non-Federally Reported Authorities in Support of filed byPaul R. Bonderson, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20)(Related document(s) 356 ) (Friese, Robert) (Filed on 11/21/2008) (Entered: 11/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Robert C. Friese in Support of 356 Reply Memorandum filed byPaul R. Bonderson, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) 356 ) (Friese, Robert) (Filed on 11/21/2008) (Entered: 11/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Reply Memorandum in Support of 320 Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rules 9(b) and 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure filed byPaul R. Bonderson, Jr. (Friese, Robert) (Filed on 11/21/2008) Modified on 11/25/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Reply Memorandum Defendant Antonio Canova's Reply in Support of 303 Motion to Dismiss Brocade's Complaint filed byAntonio Canova. (Blears, Norman) (Filed on 11/21/2008) Modified on 11/25/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Order Granting 353 Defendant Antonio Canova's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit by Antonio Canova. (Blears, Norman) (Filed on 11/21/2008) Modified on 11/25/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Defendant Antonio Canova's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit filed by Antonio Canova. Motion Hearing set for 12/5/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Blears, Norman) (Filed on 11/21/2008) (Entered: 11/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request for Judicial Notice re 350 Reply Memorandum Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed byStephanie Jensen. (Related document(s) 350 ) (Celio, Michael) (Filed on 11/21/2008) (Entered: 11/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Reply Memorandum in Support of 312 Motion to Dismiss Brocade's Second Amended Complaint filed byMichael J. Byrd. (Potter, John) (Filed on 11/21/2008) Modified on 11/25/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Reply Memorandum In Support Of 304 Motion To Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed byStephanie Jensen. (Celio, Michael) (Filed on 11/21/2008) Modified on 11/25/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Appendix re 348 Reply to Opposition, filed byRobert D. Bossi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10)(Related document(s) 348 ) (Torpey, Michael) (Filed on 11/21/2008) (Entered: 11/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Reply to Opposition re 308 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT ROBERT D. BOSSI'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed byRobert D. Bossi. (Torpey, Michael) (Filed on 11/21/2008) (Entered: 11/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Reply Memorandum in Support of 299 Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint filed byJack Cuthbert. (De Corso, Anthony) (Filed on 11/21/2008) Modified on 11/25/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Order re 344 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Omnibus Opposition to Motions to Dismiss filed by by Neal Dempsey. (Rafeedie, Ramiz) (Filed on 11/21/2008) (Entered: 11/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Jeffrey L. Bornstein in Support of 344 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Omnibus Opposition to Motions to Dismiss filed byNeal Dempsey. (Related document(s) 344 ) (Rafeedie, Ramiz) (Filed on 11/21/2008) (Entered: 11/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Omnibus Opposition to Motions to Dismiss filed by Neal Dempsey. (Rafeedie, Ramiz) (Filed on 11/21/2008) (Entered: 11/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 338 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2008) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 11/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Order re 299 , 303 , 304 , 308 , 312 , 313 , 320 , 323 , 326 , 329 . [PROPOSED] ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc. (Root, Peter) (Filed on 11/14/2008) Modified on 11/17/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 11/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request for Judicial Notice re 340 Memorandum in Opposition, REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF BROCADE COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS INC.'S OMNIBUS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS filed byBrocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Related document(s) 340 ) (Root, Peter) (Filed on 11/14/2008) (Entered: 11/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 11/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in Opposition BROCADE'S OMNIBUS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed byBrocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment A-1, # 2 Exhibit Attachment A-2 and B)(Root, Peter) (Filed on 11/14/2008) (Entered: 11/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 11/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Order re 338 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages PLAINTIFF BROCADE'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Root, Peter) (Filed on 11/14/2008) (Entered: 11/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 11/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages PLAINTIFF BROCADE'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/5/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Root, Peter) (Filed on 11/14/2008) (Entered: 11/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 11/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Peter E. Root DECLARATION OF PETER E. ROOT IN SUPPORT OF BROCADE'S OMNIBUS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed byBrocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit C-1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit C-2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 5 Exhibit Exhibits F, G, H, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit I, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit J-1, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit J-2, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit K-1, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit K-2, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit K-3, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit Exhibits N, O, P, Q)(Root, Peter) (Filed on 11/14/2008) (Entered: 11/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 11/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Change of Address by Norman J. Blears NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY INFORMATION (Blears, Norman) (Filed on 11/14/2008) (Entered: 11/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 10/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CLERKS NOTICE Rescheduling Motion Hearing. Motion(s) to Dismiss Hearing set for 12/5/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2008) (Entered: 10/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 325 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2008) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 293 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2008) (Entered: 10/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Order GRANTING DEFENDANT GREGORY L. REYES' MOTION TO DISMISS BROCADE COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS, INC.'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Gregory L. Reyes. (Marmaro, Richard) (Filed on 10/6/2008) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request for Judicial Notice re 329 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint [DEFENDANT GREGORY L. REYES' MOTION TO DISMISS BROCADE COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS, INC.'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT] MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint [DEFENDANT GREGORY L. REYES' MOTION TO DISMISS BROCADE COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS, INC.'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT] filed byGregory L. Reyes. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - E)(Related document(s) 329 ) (Marmaro, Richard) (Filed on 10/6/2008) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Appendix re 320 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rules 9(b) and 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rules 9(b) and 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure of Non-Federally Reported Authorities filed byPaul R. Bonderson, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Tab 1, # 2 Exhibit Tab 2, # 3 Exhibit Tab 3, # 4 Exhibit Tab 4, # 5 Exhibit Tab 5, # 6 Exhibit Tab 6, # 7 Exhibit Tab 7, # 8 Exhibit Tab 8, # 9 Exhibit Tab 9, # 10 Exhibit Tab 10, # 11 Exhibit Tab 11, # 12 Errata Tab 12, # 13 Exhibit Tab 13, # 14 Exhibit Tab 14, # 15 Exhibit Tab 15, # 16 Exhibit Tab 16)(Related document(s) 320 ) (Friese, Robert) (Filed on 10/6/2008) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint [DEFENDANT GREGORY L. REYES' MOTION TO DISMISS BROCADE COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS, INC.'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT] filed by Gregory L. Reyes. Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Marmaro, Richard) (Filed on 10/6/2008) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Michael Mugmon in support of Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed bySeth D. Neiman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit)(Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 10/6/2008) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request for Judicial Notice re 326 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed bySeth D. Neiman. (Related document(s) 326 ) (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 10/6/2008) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Seth D. Neiman. Motion Hearing set for 12/5/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 10/6/2008) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Seth D. Neiman. Motion Hearing set for 12/5/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration in support of Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, # 2 Proposed Order)(Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 10/6/2008) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request for Judicial Notice re 323 MOTION to Dismiss Special Litigation Committee's Second Amended Complaint filed byMark Leslie. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 323 ) (Young, Douglas) (Filed on 10/6/2008) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss Special Litigation Committee's Second Amended Complaint filed by Mark Leslie. Motion Hearing set for 12/5/2008 10:00 AM. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Young, Douglas) (Filed on 10/6/2008) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Order re 320 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rules 9(b) and 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rules 9(b) and 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by Paul R. Bonderson, Jr. (Friese, Robert) (Filed on 10/6/2008) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Robert C. Friese in Support of 320 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rules 9(b) and 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rules 9(b) and 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure filed byPaul R. Bonderson, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 320 ) (Friese, Robert) (Filed on 10/6/2008) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rules 9(b) and 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure filed by Paul R. Bonderson, Jr. Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Friese, Robert) (Filed on 10/6/2008) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Brief re 313 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint and Joinder in Motions to Dismiss filed byNeal Dempsey. (Related document(s) 313 ) (Bornstein, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/6/2008) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Order Granting Defendant Neal Dempsey's by Neal Dempsey. (Bornstein, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/6/2008) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EXHIBITS A filed byNeal Dempsey. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit C)(Bornstein, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/6/2008) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Patrick Doolittle in Support of 312 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint, 314 Request for Judicial Notice filed byMichael J. Byrd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 312 , 314 ) (Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 10/6/2008) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Jeffrey L. Bornstein in Support of 313 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint and Joinder in Motion to Discmiss filed byNeal Dempsey. (Related document(s) 313 ) (Bornstein, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/6/2008) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request for Judicial Notice re 312 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed byMichael J. Byrd. (Related document(s) 312 ) (Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 10/6/2008) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Neal Dempsey. Motion Hearing set for 12/5/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Bornstein, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/6/2008) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Michael J. Byrd. Motion Hearing set for 11/14/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)(Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 10/6/2008) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Order re 308 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT ROBERT D. BOSSI'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES by Robert D. Bossi. (Torpey, Michael) (Filed on 10/6/2008) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Appendix re 308 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT ROBERT D. BOSSI'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed byRobert D. Bossi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24 (Part 1 of 2), # 25 Exhibit 24 (Part 2 of 2), # 26 Exhibit 25, # 27 Exhibit 26 (Part 1 of 3), # 28 Exhibit 26 (Part 2 of 3), # 29 Exhibit 26 (Part 3 of 3), # 30 Exhibit 27, # 31 Exhibit 28, # 32 Exhibit 29, # 33 Exhibit 30, # 34 Exhibit 31, # 35 Exhibit 32, # 36 Exhibit 33, # 37 Exhibit 34, # 38 Exhibit 35, # 39 Exhibit 36, # 40 Exhibit 37, # 41 Exhibit 38, # 42 Exhibit 39, # 43 Exhibit 40)(Related document(s) 308 ) (Torpey, Michael) (Filed on 10/6/2008) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request for Judicial Notice re 308 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT ROBERT D. BOSSI'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed byRobert D. Bossi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E (Part 1 of 4), # 6 Exhibit E (Part 2 of 4), # 7 Exhibit E (Part 3 of 4), # 8 Exhibit E (Part 4 of 4), # 9 Exhibit F, # 10 Exhibit G, # 11 Exhibit H, # 12 Exhibit I (Part 1 of 3), # 13 Exhibit I (Part 2 of 3), # 14 Exhibit I (Part 3 of 3), # 15 Exhibit J, # 16 Exhibit K (Part 1 of 2), # 17 Exhibit K (Part 2 of 2), # 18 Exhibit L (Part 1 of 3), # 19 Exhibit L (Part 2 of 3), # 20 Exhibit L (Part 3 of 3), # 21 Exhibit M (Part 1 of 2), # 22 Exhibit M (Part 2 of 2), # 23 Exhibit N (Part 1 of 2), # 24 Exhibit N (Part 2 of 2), # 25 Exhibit O (Part 1 of 3), # 26 Exhibit O (Part 2 of 3), # 27 Exhibit O (Part 3 of 3), # 28 Exhibit P, # 29 Exhibit Q, # 30 Exhibit R, # 31 Exhibit S (Part 1 of 2), # 32 Exhibit S (Part 2 of 2), # 33 Exhibit T)(Related document(s) 308 ) (Torpey, Michael) (Filed on 10/6/2008) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT ROBERT D. BOSSI'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed by Robert D. Bossi. Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Torpey, Michael) (Filed on 10/6/2008) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by Stephanie Jensen. (Little, Jan) (Filed on 10/6/2008) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Steven P. Ragland in Support of 305 Stephanie Jensen's Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Her Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed byStephanie Jensen. (Little, Jan) (Filed on 10/6/2008) Modified on 10/7/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request for Judicial Notice In Support of 304 Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed byStephanie Jensen. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Little, Jan) (Filed on 10/6/2008) Modified on 10/7/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6); Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Stephanie Jensen. Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Little, Jan) (Filed on 10/6/2008) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 301 filed by Antonio Canova. Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Canova's Proposed Order re Motion to Dismiss)(Kelley, Colin) (Filed on 10/6/2008) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request for Judicial Notice re 301 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint filed byAntonio Canova. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit for Request for Judicial Notice)(Related document(s) 301 ) (Kelley, Colin) (Filed on 10/6/2008) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 303 . *** MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint filed by Antonio Canova. Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Kelley, Colin) (Filed on 10/6/2008) Modified on 10/7/2008 (ewn, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request for Judicial Notice re 299 MOTION to Dismiss The Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 9(b) and 12(b)(6); Memorandum of Points and Authorties in Support Thereof MOTION to Dismiss The Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 9(b) and 12(b)(6); Memorandum of Points and Authorties in Support Thereof filed byJack Cuthbert. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9)(Related document(s) 299 ) (De Corso, Anthony) (Filed on 10/6/2008) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss The Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 9(b) and 12(b)(6); Memorandum of Points and Authorties in Support Thereof filed by Jack Cuthbert. Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "Securities Litigation: Primary Liability of 'Secondary' Actors" Ralph C. Ferrara, With J. Porter Wiseman, Bloomberg Law Reports, January 15, 2007)(De Corso, Anthony) (Filed on 10/6/2008) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Leave To File Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Excess of 15 Pages by Neal Dempsey. (Rafeedie, Ramiz) (Filed on 10/6/2008) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Unopposed filed by Neal Dempsey. (Rafeedie, Ramiz) (Filed on 10/6/2008) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 289 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2008) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 287 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2008) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 285 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2008) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Antonio Canova. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order re Canova Motion to File Overlength Brief)(Kelley, Colin) (Filed on 10/6/2008) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 10/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Michael Knaster and Justyna Walukiewicz (Knaster, Stephen) (Filed on 10/3/2008) (Entered: 10/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 10/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Order re 289 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages DEFENDANTS ROBERT D. BOSSI AND JACK CUTHBERT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE OVERLENGTH BRIEFS IN SUPPORT OF MOTIONS TO DISMISS by Robert D. Bossi, Jack Cuthbert. (Torpey, Michael) (Filed on 10/3/2008) (Entered: 10/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 10/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of WALTER F. BROWN, JR. in Support of 289 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages DEFENDANTS ROBERT D. BOSSI AND JACK CUTHBERT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE OVERLENGTH BRIEFS IN SUPPORT OF MOTIONS TO DISMISS filed byRobert D. Bossi, Jack Cuthbert. (Related document(s) 289 ) (Torpey, Michael) (Filed on 10/3/2008) (Entered: 10/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 10/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages DEFENDANTS ROBERT D. BOSSI AND JACK CUTHBERT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE OVERLENGTH BRIEFS IN SUPPORT OF MOTIONS TO DISMISS filed by Robert D. Bossi, Jack Cuthbert. (Torpey, Michael) (Filed on 10/3/2008) (Entered: 10/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 10/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Defendant Gregory L. Reyes' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Excess of 15 pages by Gregory L. Reyes. (Waltzer, Garrett) (Filed on 10/3/2008) (Entered: 10/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 10/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Defendant Gregory L. Reyes' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Excess of 15 pages filed by Gregory L. Reyes. (Waltzer, Garrett) (Filed on 10/3/2008) (Entered: 10/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 10/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Order re 285 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Defendant Michael Byrd's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Excess of 15 Pages by Michael J. Byrd. (Cohen, Josh) (Filed on 10/3/2008) (Entered: 10/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 10/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Defendant Michael Byrd's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Excess of 15 Pages filed by Michael J. Byrd. (Cohen, Josh) (Filed on 10/3/2008) (Entered: 10/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 10/2/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Amending Second Amended Complaint by Dismissing Two Causes of Action as to Defendants Neal Dempsey and Seth D. Neiman re 282 Stipulation filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/01/08. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2008) (Entered: 10/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 9/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Alexander M.R. Lyon (Lyon, Alexander) (Filed on 9/30/2008) (Entered: 09/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 9/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER AMENDING SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT BY DISMISSING TWO CAUSES OF ACTION AS TO DEFENDANTS NEAL DEMPSEY AND SETH D. NEIMAN by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Root, Peter) (Filed on 9/26/2008) (Entered: 09/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 9/18/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 277 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (L. Roberts) (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2008) (Entered: 09/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 9/18/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Jury Trial set for 6/15/2009 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/18/08. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2008) (Entered: 09/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 9/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry: Trial Setting held on 9/18/2008 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 9/18/2008), Motion Hearing held on 9/18/2008 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 9/18/2008) re 259 MOTION Request for Trial Date filed by Michael J. Byrd, 263 MOTION Proposed Trial Date Defendant's Robert Bossi's and Jack Cuthbert's Proposed Trial Date filed by Jack Cuthbert, Robert D. Bossi, 239 MOTION to Stay BROCADE COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS, INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO LIFT DISCOVERY STAY UNDER PRIVATE SECURITIES LITIGATION REFORM ACT OF 1995 filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., ***Motions terminated: 259 MOTION Request for Trial Date filed by Michael J. Byrd, 263 MOTION Proposed Trial Date Defendant's Robert Bossi's and Jack Cuthbert's Proposed Trial Date filed by Jack Cuthbert, Robert D. Bossi, 239 MOTION to Stay BROCADE COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS, INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO LIFT DISCOVERY STAY UNDER PRIVATE SECURITIES LITIGATION REFORM ACT OF 1995 filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc... Jury Selection set for 6/11/2009 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Pretrial Conference set for 6/4/2009 02:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Court Reporter Sahar McVickar.) (be, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/18/2008) (Entered: 09/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Order re 277 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Lyle Roberts ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611023377.) Proposed order granting application for admission of attorney Pro Hac Vice by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Root, Peter) (Filed on 9/15/2008) (Entered: 09/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Lyle Roberts ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611023377.) filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Root, Peter) (Filed on 9/15/2008) (Entered: 09/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Reply Memorandum re 239 MOTION to Stay BROCADE COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS, INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO LIFT DISCOVERY STAY UNDER PRIVATE SECURITIES LITIGATION REFORM ACT OF 1995 REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO LIFT PSLRA DISCOVERY STAY filed byBrocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Root, Peter) (Filed on 9/12/2008) (Entered: 09/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 9/9/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 274 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (R. Wechkin) (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2008) (Entered: 09/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Robin Wechkin) ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611023197.) filed by Antonio Canova. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2008) (Entered: 09/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc. PLAINTIFF'S FURTHER SUBMISSION RE: TRIAL DATES SETTING (Root, Peter) (Filed on 9/8/2008) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Order [Proposed] Case Management and Scheduling Order by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Root, Peter) (Filed on 9/8/2008) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROOF OF SERVICE re 258 Memorandum in Opposition, 257 Notice of Appearance, 263 MOTION Proposed Trial Date Defendant's Robert Bossi's and Jack Cuthbert's Proposed Trial Date by Robert D. Bossi, Jack Cuthbert. (Kwon, Ruth) (Filed on 9/8/2008) Modified on 9/9/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Antonio Canova Submission re Trial Date (Lyon, Alexander) (Filed on 9/8/2008) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Corrected Statement of Defendant Gregory L. Reyes Regarding Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.'s Proposed May 11, 2009, Trial Date filed by Gregory L. Reyes. (Marmaro, Richard) (Filed on 9/5/2008) (Entered: 09/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 269 . *** JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Statement of Defendant Gregory L. Reyes Regarding Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.'s Proposed May 11, 2009, Trial Date filed by Gregory L. Reyes. (Marmaro, Richard) (Filed on 9/5/2008) Modified on 9/8/2008 (ewn, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Michael A. Mugmon in Support of 266 Brief Outside Directors' Submission Regarding Trial Date and Related Pre-Trial Matters filed bySeth D. Neiman. (Related document(s) 266 ) (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 9/5/2008) (Entered: 09/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Brief Outside Directors' Submission Regarding Trial Date and Related Pre-Trial Matters filed bySeth D. Neiman. (Mugmon, Michael) (Filed on 9/5/2008) (Entered: 09/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Stephanie Jensen STATEMENT RE TRIAL DATE (Ragland, Steven) (Filed on 9/5/2008) (Entered: 09/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Paul Ragland (Ragland, Steven) (Filed on 9/5/2008) (Entered: 09/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION Proposed Trial Date Defendant's Robert Bossi's and Jack Cuthbert's Proposed Trial Date filed by Robert D. Bossi, Jack Cuthbert. (Torpey, Michael) (Filed on 9/5/2008) (Entered: 09/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in Opposition re 239 MOTION to Stay BROCADE COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS, INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO LIFT DISCOVERY STAY UNDER PRIVATE SECURITIES LITIGATION REFORM ACT OF 1995 filed byNeal Dempsey. (Rafeedie, Ramiz) (Filed on 9/5/2008) (Entered: 09/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in Opposition re 239 MOTION to Stay BROCADE COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS, INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO LIFT DISCOVERY STAY UNDER PRIVATE SECURITIES LITIGATION REFORM ACT OF 1995 filed byJack Cuthbert. (Gressler, Eric) (Filed on 9/5/2008) (Entered: 09/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition to 239 Motion to Lift the Automatic Discovery Stay Imposed by the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act filed byMichael J. Byrd. (Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 9/5/2008) Modified on 9/8/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION Request for Trial Date filed by Michael J. Byrd. (Doolittle, Patrick) (Filed on 9/5/2008) (Entered: 09/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum in Opposition re 239 MOTION to Stay BROCADE COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS, INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO LIFT DISCOVERY STAY UNDER PRIVATE SECURITIES LITIGATION REFORM ACT OF 1995 Defendant Robert Bossi's Opposition To Brocade's Motion To Lift PSLRA Discovery Stay filed byRobert D. Bossi. (Torpey, Michael) (Filed on 9/5/2008) (Entered: 09/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Michael David Torpey Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Torpey, Michael) (Filed on 9/5/2008) (Entered: 09/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Mark E. Beck for Defendant Jack Cuthbert (Beck, Mark) (Filed on 9/5/2008) (Entered: 09/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in Opposition re 239 MOTION to Stay BROCADE COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS, INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO LIFT DISCOVERY STAY UNDER PRIVATE SECURITIES LITIGATION REFORM ACT OF 1995 filed byAntonio Canova. (Lyon, Alexander) (Filed on 9/5/2008) (Entered: 09/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in Opposition re 239 MOTION to Stay BROCADE COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS, INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO LIFT DISCOVERY STAY UNDER PRIVATE SECURITIES LITIGATION REFORM ACT OF 1995 filed byPaul R. Bonderson, Jr. (Friese, Robert) (Filed on 9/5/2008) (Entered: 09/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT RE TRIAL DATE (RESPONSE TO COURT REQUEST FOR STATEMENT) filed by Paul R. Bonderson, Jr. (Friese, Robert) (Filed on 9/5/2008) (Entered: 09/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Charles Friese as Counsel for Defendant Paul R. Bonderson, Jr. (Friese, Robert) (Filed on 9/5/2008) (Entered: 09/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re 233 Stipulation filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc. The parties to this action are realigned, with Brocade re-designated as the sole party-plaintiff and substituted for the shareholder plaintiffs. The shareholder plaintiffs are hereby dismissed from this action. Motions terminated: 221 MOTION Motion to Realign the Parties Notice of Motion and Motion to Realign the Parties filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc... Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/27/08. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2008) (Entered: 08/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Francis A. Bottini, Jr. and Marc M. Umeda Describing the Tasks Performed by Their Firms filed byChean Shee Lim, Mary E. Barbour. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Umeda, Marc) (Filed on 8/25/2008) (Entered: 08/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Marc M. Umeda in Response to Court's August 19, 2008 Order Regarding the Number of Hours Spent Litigating this Action, Counsel's Hourly Rate, and Costs Incurred filed byChean Shee Lim. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Umeda, Marc) (Filed on 8/25/2008) (Entered: 08/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Francis A. Bottini, Jr. filed byMary E. Barbour. (Bottini, Francis) (Filed on 8/25/2008) (Entered: 08/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Francis A. Bottini, Jr. in Response to Court's Order re Fees and Costs filed byMary E. Barbour. (Bottini, Francis) (Filed on 8/25/2008) (Entered: 08/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Transcript of Proceedings held on August 21, 2008, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter/Transcriber Belle Ball, CSR, RMR, CRR, e-mail address belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov, Telephone number (415)373-2529. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/17/2008. (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 8/22/2008) (Entered: 08/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter Engagement Letters Filed at the Request of the Honorable Charles Breyer. (Caulfield, Barbara) (Filed on 8/21/2008) (Entered: 08/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 245 . *** Letter Engagement Letters Filed at the Request of the Hon. Charles Breyer. (Caulfield, Barbara) (Filed on 8/21/2008) Modified on 8/22/2008 (ewn, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter post dated 8/11/08: from Mary E. Barbour re Barbour vs. Reyes. (aaa, Court Staff) (Filed on 8/14/2008) (Entered: 08/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 8/21/2008 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 8/21/2008). Motion to Lift Discovery Stay Hearing/Trial Dates set for 9/18/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Court Reporter 8/21/08.) (be, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/21/2008) (Entered: 08/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Order re 240 Declaration in Support,, 239 MOTION to Stay BROCADE COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS, INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO LIFT DISCOVERY STAY UNDER PRIVATE SECURITIES LITIGATION REFORM ACT OF 1995 [PROPOSED] ORDER by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Caulfield, Barbara) (Filed on 8/20/2008) (Entered: 08/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Barbara Caulfield in Support of 239 MOTION to Stay BROCADE COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS, INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO LIFT DISCOVERY STAY UNDER PRIVATE SECURITIES LITIGATION REFORM ACT OF 1995 DECLARATION OF BARBARA CAULFIELD IN SUPPORT OF BROCADE COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS, INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO LIFT DISCOVERY STAY UNDER PRIVATE SECURITIES LITIGATION REFORM ACT OF 1995 filed byBrocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2-1, # 3 Exhibit 2-2, # 4 Exhibit 2-3, # 5 Exhibit 2-4, # 6 Exhibit 2-5, # 7 Exhibit 2-6, # 8 Exhibit 2-7)(Related document(s) 239 ) (Caulfield, Barbara) (Filed on 8/20/2008) (Entered: 08/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Stay BROCADE COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS, INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO LIFT DISCOVERY STAY UNDER PRIVATE SECURITIES LITIGATION REFORM ACT OF 1995 filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/26/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Caulfield, Barbara) (Filed on 8/20/2008) (Entered: 08/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Josh Alan Cohen , Quinn Emanuel Urquhart Oliver
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT SUPPLEMENT TO JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Caulfield, Barbara) (Filed on 8/19/2008) (Entered: 08/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER. Signed by Judge Breyer on 8/19/2008. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2008) (Entered: 08/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION re 234 Proposed Order Amended Stipulation by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Caulfield, Barbara) (Filed on 8/19/2008) (Entered: 08/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Order re 233 Stipulation by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Caulfield, Barbara) (Filed on 8/18/2008) (Entered: 08/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Caulfield, Barbara) (Filed on 8/18/2008) (Entered: 08/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER extending time limit to answer, move or otherwise respond to the second amended complaint re 229 Stipulation filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/18/08. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2008) (Entered: 08/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER. Signed by Judge Breyer on 8/18/2008. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2008) (Entered: 08/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Case Management Conference Statement filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Root, Peter) (Filed on 8/14/2008) (Entered: 08/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Time Limit to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Second Amended Complaint by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Root, Peter) (Filed on 8/13/2008) (Entered: 08/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT Submission of Second Amended Complaint With Errata Corrected . Filed byBrocade Communications Systems, Inc. (Root, Peter) (Filed on 8/6/2008) Modified on 8/7/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ERRATA re 222 Proposed Order Notice of Errata by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Root, Peter) (Filed on 8/5/2008) (Entered: 08/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc. re 220 Amended Complaint,, Notice of Erratum (Root, Peter) (Filed on 8/4/2008) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re 219 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/04/08. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2008) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 8/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Peter E. Root in Support of 221 MOTION Motion to Realign the Parties Notice of Motion and Motion to Realign the Parties, 222 Proposed Order, 220 Amended Complaint,, Declaration of Peter E. Root Regarding Failed Attempts to File Electronically filed byBrocade Communications Systems, Inc. (Related document(s) 221 , 222 , 220 ) (Root, Peter) (Filed on 8/3/2008) Modified on 8/4/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 8/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.Notice of Appearance of Counsel (Holmes, Stephen) (Filed on 8/2/2008) Modified on 8/4/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 8/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Order re 221 MOTION Motion to Realign the Parties Notice of Motion and Motion to Realign the Parties [Proposed] Order by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Holmes, Stephen) (Filed on 8/2/2008) (Entered: 08/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 8/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION Motion to Realign the Parties Notice of Motion and Motion to Realign the Parties filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/19/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Holmes, Stephen) (Filed on 8/2/2008) (Entered: 08/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 220 Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint against Gregory L. Reyes, Antonio Canova, Seth D. Neiman. Filed byBrocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement, # 2 Supplement, # 3 Supplement, # 4 Supplement, # 5 Supplement, # 6 Supplement, # 7 Supplement, # 8 Supplement, # 9 Supplement, # 10 Supplement, # 11 Supplement, # 12 Supplement, # 13 Supplement, # 14 Supplement, # 15 Supplement, # 16 Supplement, # 17 Supplement, # 18 Supplement, # 19 Supplement, # 20 Supplement, # 21 Supplement, # 22 Supplement, # 23 Supplement, # 24 Supplement, # 25 Supplement, # 26 Supplement, # 27 Supplement)(Holmes, Stephen) (Filed on 8/1/2008) (Entered: 08/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Grant P. Fondo Request for Order Permitting Withdrawal of Counsel and Substitution of New Counsel for Defendant Brocade Communications Systems, Inc. (Fondo, Grant) (Filed on 8/1/2008) (Entered: 08/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re 217 Case Management Statement filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. Signed by Judge Breyer on 7/30/2008. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2008) (Entered: 07/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Proposed Order)(Fondo, Grant) (Filed on 7/29/2008) (Entered: 07/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re 215 Proposed Order filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc. SLC file any Amended Complaint by 8/1/2008; Motions to Dismiss or Stay due by 8/1/2008. All discovery in this action is stayed until further notice. Plantiff may file any motions but no responses need be filed until after 8/01/08. Counsel to work out schedule. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/18/08. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2008) (Entered: 06/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Order Setting Schedule for Special Litigation Committee by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc. (Penning, James) (Filed on 6/17/2008) Modified on 6/18/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 211 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Jacob Goldberg) (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2008) (Entered: 06/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 210 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Christopher Marlborough) (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2008) (Entered: 06/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 6/12/2008 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 6/12/2008). (Court Reporter Raynee Mercado.) (be, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/12/2008) (Entered: 06/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Jacob A. Goldberg) ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611020155.) filed by Anjani K Jha, William Pratt. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2008) (Entered: 06/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Christopher Marlborough) ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611020156.) filed by Anjani K Jha, William Pratt. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2008) (Entered: 06/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Supplemental Case Management Conference Statement filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A)(Fondo, Grant) (Filed on 6/9/2008) (Entered: 06/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Joint) filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Fondo, Grant) (Filed on 6/6/2008) (Entered: 06/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re 206 Stipulation filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/12/2008 01:30 PM. Case management statement filed by June 6, 2008.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/2/08. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2008) (Entered: 06/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Continue the June 6, 2008 Case Management Conference by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Fondo, Grant) (Filed on 6/2/2008) (Entered: 06/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 204 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (J E Richman) (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2008) (Entered: 05/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Jonathan E. Richman) ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611019612.) filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2008) (Entered: 05/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 189 Motion to Relate Case C-08-2029JSW with C-05-2233CRB and C-05-2042CRB, the Barbour action is not consolidated into C-05-2233CRB (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2008) (Entered: 05/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/27/08. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2008) (Entered: 05/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION and [Proposed] Protective Order Regarding Confidentiality by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Fondo, Grant) (Filed on 5/22/2008) (Entered: 05/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Ramiz I. Rafeedie (Rafeedie, Ramiz) (Filed on 5/19/2008) (Entered: 05/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 195 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Ralph C. Ferrara) (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2008) (Entered: 04/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 194 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Ann M. Ashton) (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2008) (Entered: 04/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/25/08 before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter: Connie Kuhl. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2008) (Entered: 04/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 4/25/2008 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 4/25/2008). Further Case Management Conference set for 6/6/2008 08:30 AM. (Court Reporter Connie Kuhl.) (be, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/25/2008) (Entered: 04/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Ralph C. Ferrara) ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611018513.) filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2008) (Entered: 04/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Ann M. Ashton)( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611018514.) filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2008) (Entered: 04/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mary E. Barbour re 190 MOTION to Relate Case, 191 Declaration in support and 192 Proposed Order. (Bottini, Francis) (Filed on 4/23/2008) Modified on 4/24/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Order re 190 MOTION to Relate Case by Mary E. Barbour. (Bottini, Francis) (Filed on 4/23/2008) (Entered: 04/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Frank Bottini in Support of 190 MOTION to Relate Case filed byMary E. Barbour. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, 1A, # 2 Exhibit A 1B, # 3 Exhibit A 1C, # 4 Exhibit A part2)(Related document(s) 190 ) (Bottini, Francis) (Filed on 4/23/2008) (Entered: 04/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Relate Case filed by Mary E. Barbour. (Bottini, Francis) (Filed on 4/23/2008) (Entered: 04/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                *** DUPLICATE ENTRY. SEE 190 *** MOTION to Relate Case filed by Mary E. Barbour. (Bottini, Francis) (Filed on 4/23/2008) Modified on 4/24/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Mary E. Barbour. (Bottini, Francis) (Filed on 4/23/2008) (Entered: 04/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Francis A. Bottini, Jr (Bottini, Francis) (Filed on 4/23/2008) (Entered: 04/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Brocade's Supplemental Case Management Conference Statement filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Fondo, Grant) (Filed on 4/22/2008) (Entered: 04/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Fondo, Grant) (Filed on 4/16/2008) (Entered: 04/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re 183 Stipulation filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/25/2008 08:30 AM.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/3/08. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2008) (Entered: 04/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Continue April 4, 2008 Case Management Conference to May 9, 2008 by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Fondo, Grant) (Filed on 4/2/2008) (Entered: 04/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CLERK'S NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 4/4/2008 08:30 AM. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2008) (Entered: 04/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc. re 180 Order,, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,, Set Hearings, Nominal Defendant Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.'s Statement Regarding Hearing for Final Approval (Fondo, Grant) (Filed on 3/21/2008) (Entered: 03/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re 179 Stipulation filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., Set/Reset Deadlines as to 179 Stipulation. Replies due by 3/25/2008. Responses due by 3/20/2008. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/4/2007 10:00 AM. Motion Hearing set for 4/4/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/22/08. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2008) (Entered: 02/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION re 178 Order, and Proposed Order to Continue Final Approval Hearing to April 4, 2008 by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Singerman, Benjamin) (Filed on 2/20/2008) (Entered: 02/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 12/26/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re 177 Stipulation filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/26/07. (Final Approval and CMC hearing contd. to 3/7/2008 @ 10:00 a.m. Briefs due 2/21/2008. Rely briefs due 2/26/2008)(fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2007) Modified on 12/26/2007 (fj, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Continue Final Approval Hearing to March 7, 2008 by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Fondo, Grant) (Filed on 12/21/2007) (Entered: 12/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 12/7/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re 175 Stipulation filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., Set/Reset Deadlines as to 175 Stipulation. Final Approval Hearing set for 2/8/2008 10:00 AM. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/8/2008 10:00 AM. Responses due by 1/24/2008. Replies due by 1/29/2008.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/07/07. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2007) (Entered: 12/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Continue Final Approval Hearing to February 8, 2008 by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Santamaria, Jessica) (Filed on 12/6/2007) (Entered: 12/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 11/7/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re 173 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by David L. House, Sanjay Vaswani, Nicholas G. Moore, Robert R. Walker, L. William Krause, Michael Klayko, Christopher B. Paisley, Attorney Stephen D. Hibbard for Christopher B. Paisley and David L. House added. Attorney Cameron Powers Hoffman; Christopher R. Howald; Nina F. Locker; David Andrew McCarthy; Mark Thomas Oakes; Steven Guggenheim and Caz Hashemi terminated.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/7/07. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2007) (Entered: 11/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Crystal Mothershead Gaudette for David House, Michael Klayko, William Krause, Nicholas Moore, Christopher Paisley, Sanjay Vaswani and Robert Walker (Gaudette, Crystal) (Filed on 11/6/2007) (Entered: 11/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 169 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2007) (Entered: 10/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 168 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2007) (Entered: 10/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 167 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2007) (Entered: 10/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Jonathan A. Shapiro)) ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611011408.) filed by Seth D. Neiman. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2007) (Entered: 10/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Jeffrey B. Rudman) ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611011409.) filed by Seth D. Neiman. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2007) (Entered: 10/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Michael A. Mugmon) ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611011410.) filed by Seth D. Neiman. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2007) (Entered: 10/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re 163 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Neal Dempsey, Attorney Caz Hashemi; Cameron Powers Hoffman; Christopher R. Howald; Nina F. Locker; David Andrew McCarthy; Mark Thomas Oakes; Crystal Mothershead Gaudette and Steven Guggenheim terminated.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/12/07. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2007) (Entered: 10/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re 162 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Seth D. Neiman, Attorney Jeffrey B. Rudman for Seth D. Neiman added. Attorney Caz Hashemi; Cameron Powers Hoffman; Christopher R. Howald; Nina F. Locker; David Andrew McCarthy; Mark Thomas Oakes; Crystal Mothershead Gaudette and Steven Guggenheim terminated.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/12/07. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2007) (Entered: 10/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Set/Reset Deadlines as to Responses due by 12/6/2007. Replies due by 12/11/2007. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/21/2007 10:00 AM. Final Approval Hearing set for 12/21/2007 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/10/07. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/11/2007 (be, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Crystal Mothershead Gaudette for Neal Dempsey (Gaudette, Crystal) (Filed on 10/11/2007) (Entered: 10/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Crystal Mothershead Gaudette for Seth D. Neiman (Gaudette, Crystal) (Filed on 10/11/2007) (Entered: 10/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey L. Bornstein for Neil Dempsey.(Bornstein, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/11/2007) Modified on 10/12/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Continue Final Approval Hearing to December 21, 2007 by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Santamaria, Jessica) (Filed on 10/9/2007) (Entered: 10/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 8/23/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER RELATING CASE C-07-4223CRB to CR-06-0556CRB, C-06-2786CRB, C-05-2233CRB and C-05-2042CRB. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/23/07. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2007) (Entered: 08/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 8/17/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER to continue Final Approval Hearing to 11/1/2007 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 08/17/07. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2007) (Entered: 08/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Continue Final Approval Hearing by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Fondo, Grant) (Filed on 8/14/2007) (Entered: 08/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY *** NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony I. Fenwick (Fenwick, Anthony) (Filed on 6/4/2007) Modified on 6/6/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER re 154 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.,, Attorney John C. Dwyer for Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., Jessica Valenzuela Santamaria for Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., James M. Penning for Brocade Communications Systems, Inc. added. Attorney Cameron Powers Hoffman; Christopher R. Howald; Nina F. Locker; David Andrew McCarthy; Mark Thomas Oakes; Steven Guggenheim and Caz Hashemi terminated.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/29/07. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2007) (Entered: 05/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Mark Thomas Oakes Request for Order Permitting Withdrawal of Counsel and Substitution of New Counsel for Brocade Communications Systems, Inc. (Oakes, Mark) (Filed on 5/25/2007) (Entered: 05/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Antonio Canova Waiver of Objection to Law Clerk's Employment (Blears, Norman) (Filed on 5/23/2007) (Entered: 05/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 5/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Change of Address by Mary E. Alexander for Faruqi
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 5/16/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/27/07 before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter: Joan Marie Columbini. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2007) (Entered: 05/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 5/2/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 148 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2007) (Entered: 05/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Puerto Rico Government Employees Retirement Systems re Received Order, 148 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 3461100573.) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2007) (Entered: 04/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Sean Handler ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611005737.) filed by Puerto Rico Government Employees Retirement Systems. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/1/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry: Hearing In Aid Of Judgment held on 4/27/2007 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 4/27/2007). Further Case Management Conference set for 8/24/2007 10:00 AM. Motion Hearing set for 8/24/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Court Reporter Joan Columbini.) (be, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/27/2007) (Entered: 04/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 4/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter from William B. Federman. (Federman, William) (Filed on 4/26/2007) (Entered: 04/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 4/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to re 137 Memorandum in Opposition, 129 Objection, 144 Memorandum in Opposition, 134 Memorandum in Support,, 142 Memorandum in Opposition, 139 Memorandum in Opposition, Statement of Position by KMPG, LLP. (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/26/2007) (Entered: 04/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum in Opposition (Corrected) to Plaintiffs' Motion to Continue Final Approval Hearing filed byChean Shee Lim. (Bottini, Francis) (Filed on 4/23/2007) (Entered: 04/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Oppostion to Mtn to Continue filed byChean Shee Lim. (Bottini, Francis) (Filed on 4/23/2007) (Entered: 04/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Continue filed byChean Shee Lim. (Bottini, Francis) (Filed on 4/23/2007) (Entered: 04/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 4/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Derivative Plaintiffs' Request to Delay Settlement Hearing by Arkansas Public Employees Retirement System, Puerto Rico Government Employees Retirement Systems. (Fong, Linda) (Filed on 4/20/2007) (Entered: 04/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 4/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Mark Oakes in Support of 139 Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Objections to the Proposed Settlement filed byChristopher B. Paisley, David L. House, Nicholas G. Moore, L. William Krause, Sanjay Vaswani, Robert R. Walker, Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., Michael Klayko, Seth D. Neiman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(Oakes, Mark) (Filed on 4/20/2007) Modified on 4/24/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 4/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in Opposition to Objections to Proposed Settlement filed byChristopher B. Paisley, Nicholas G. Moore, L. William Krause, Sanjay Vaswani, Robert R. Walker, Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., Michael Klayko, Seth D. Neiman, Neal Dempsey. (Oakes, Mark) (Filed on 4/20/2007) (Entered: 04/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 4/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proof of Service re 137 by Anjani K Jha . (Federman, William) (Filed on 4/20/2007) Modified on 4/24/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 4/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Objections to Proposed Stipulation of Settlement filed byAnjani K Jha. (Federman, William) (Filed on 4/20/2007) (Entered: 04/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Sharla N. Hilburn in Support of 134 Memorandum in Support, Declaration of Sharla N. Hilburn in Support of Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Objection to Proposed Settlement by State Court Derivative Plaintiff Chean Shee Lim filed byChean Shee Lim. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit B# 5 Exhibit B# 6 Exhibit B# 7 Exhibit B# 8 Exhibit B# 9 Exhibit C# 10 Exhibit D# 11 Exhibit E# 12 Exhibit F# 13 Exhibit G# 14 Exhibit H# 15 Exhibit I# 16 Exhibit J# 17 Exhibit J# 18 Exhibit J# 19 Exhibit J# 20 Exhibit J# 21 Exhibit J# 22 Exhibit J# 23 Exhibit J# 24 Exhibit J# 25 Exhibit J# 26 Exhibit J# 27 Exhibit J# 28 Exhibit G# 29 Exhibit J# 30 Exhibit J# 31 Exhibit J# 32 Exhibit K# 33 Exhibit J# 34 Exhibit J# 35 Exhibit N# 36 Exhibit J# 37 Exhibit J# 38 Exhibit P# 39 Exhibit J# 40 Exhibit J# 41 Exhibit J# 42 Exhibit J# 43 Exhibit J# 44 Exhibit J# 45 Exhibit V# 46 Exhibit J# 47 Exhibit W# 48 Exhibit J# 49 Exhibit J# 50 Exhibit K# 51 Exhibit L# 52 Exhibit M# 53 Exhibit M# 54 Exhibit N)(Related document(s) 134 ) (Umeda, Marc) (Filed on 4/16/2007) (Entered: 04/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Postpone Consideration of Final Approval of Settlement filed byAnjani K Jha. (Federman, William) (Filed on 4/16/2007) (Entered: 04/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re 129 Objection Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Objection to Proposed Settlement by State Court Derivative Plaintiff Chean Shee Lim filed byChean Shee Lim. (Related document(s) 129 ) (Umeda, Marc) (Filed on 4/16/2007) (Entered: 04/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Anjani K Jha of Voluntary Withdrawal of Stephen Knee and Robert Galluscio as Co-Lead Plaintiffs (Federman, William) (Filed on 4/16/2007) (Entered: 04/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 4/9/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re 128 Stipulation filed by Stephen Knee,. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/6/07. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2007) (Entered: 04/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 4/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proof of Service re 129 Objection, 130 Declaration in Support by Chean Shee Lim. (Umeda, Marc) (Filed on 4/6/2007) Modified on 4/9/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 4/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Sharla N. Hilburn in Support of 129 Objection Declaration of Sharla N. Hilburn in Support of Objection to Proposed Settlement by State Derivative Plaintiff Chean Shee Lim filed byChean Shee Lim. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Part 1 of 3)# 2 Exhibit A (Part 2 of 3)# 3 Exhibit A (Part 3 of 3)# 4 Exhibit B# 5 Exhibit C# 6 Exhibit D# 7 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) 129 ) (Umeda, Marc) (Filed on 4/6/2007) (Entered: 04/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 4/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OBJECTIONS to Objection to Proposed Settlement by State Court Derivative Plaintiff Chean Shee Lim by Chean Shee Lim. (Umeda, Marc) (Filed on 4/6/2007) (Entered: 04/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 4/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order for Extension of Plaintiff's Time to File Papers in Connection with a Motion for Final Approval of Settlement by Stephen Knee. (Federman, William) (Filed on 4/5/2007) (Entered: 04/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 4/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OBJECTIONS to Proposed Stipulation of Settlement by Puerto Rico Government Employees Retirement Systems, Arkansas Public Employees Retirement System. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(King, Laurence) (Filed on 4/4/2007) (Entered: 04/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 2/15/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 100 Motion for Settlement (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2007) (Entered: 02/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 123 Motion withdrawal of counsel for plaintiff Knee and Galluscio (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2007) (Entered: 02/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 1/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Order GRANTING MISCELLANEOUS ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST TO WITHDRAW BRAMSON, PLUTZIK, MAHLER
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 1/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION TO WITHDRAW BRAMSON, PLUTZIK, MAHLER
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 11/2/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/6/06 before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter: Sahar McVickar. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2006) (Entered: 11/02/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 10/27/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter dated 10/26/06 from Steven D. Guggenheim re settlement. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2006) (Entered: 11/02/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 10/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 10/6/2006 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 10/6/2006) re 100 MOTION for Settlement (Court Reporter Sahar McVickar.) (be, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/6/2006) (Entered: 10/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 10/4/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Change of Address by William B. Federman (Federman, William) (Filed on 10/4/2006) (Entered: 10/04/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of ADAM GONNELLI in Support of 117 Brief IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL filed byStephen Knee. (Related document(s) 117 ) (Schofield, Kathryn) (Filed on 9/29/2006) (Entered: 09/29/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Brief re 115 Memorandum in Support PLAINTIFFS' SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF PROPOSED SETTLEMENT filed byStephen Knee. (Related document(s) 115 ) (Schofield, Kathryn) (Filed on 9/29/2006) (Entered: 09/29/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Mark T. Oakes in Support of 115 Memorandum in Support of Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.'s Memorandum of Law in Support of Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement filed byBrocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) 115 ) (Oakes, Mark) (Filed on 9/29/2006) (Entered: 09/29/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.'s Memorandum of Law in Support of Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement filed byBrocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Oakes, Mark) (Filed on 9/29/2006) (Entered: 09/29/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 9/12/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re 113 Stipulation, filed by Robert R. Walker,, Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.,, Seth D. Neiman,, Neal Dempsey,, Christopher B. Paisley,, David L. House,, Nicholas G. Moore,, L. William Krause,, Sanjay Vaswani,, Michael Klayko,. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/12/06. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2006) (Entered: 09/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 9/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER CONTINUING PRELIMINARY SETTLEMENT HEARING AND MODIFYING BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Christopher B. Paisley, David L. House, Nicholas G. Moore, L. William Krause, Sanjay Vaswani, Robert R. Walker, Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., Michael Klayko, Seth D. Neiman, Neal Dempsey. (Howald, Christopher) (Filed on 9/8/2006) (Entered: 09/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 8/28/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/18/2006 before Judge Charles R. Breyer.. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2006) (Entered: 09/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 8/28/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re 110 Stipulation, filed by Robert R. Walker,, Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.,, Seth D. Neiman,, Neal Dempsey,, Christopher B. Paisley,, David L. House,, Nicholas G. Moore,, L. William Krause,, Sanjay Vaswani,, Michael Klayko,, ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 110 Stipulation,, 100 MOTION for Settlement CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 99 : Motion Hearing set for 9/22/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/25/06. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2006) (Entered: 08/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 8/22/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Continuing Preliminary Settlement Hearing and Modifying Briefing Schedule by Christopher B. Paisley, David L. House, Nicholas G. Moore, L. William Krause, Sanjay Vaswani, Robert R. Walker, Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., Michael Klayko, Seth D. Neiman, Neal Dempsey. (Oakes, Mark) (Filed on 8/22/2006) (Entered: 08/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 8/18/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 8/18/2006 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 8/18/2006) re 98 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement filed by Stephen Knee,. Motion Hearing set for 8/28/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Court Reporter Connie Kuhl) (be, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/18/2006) Modified on 9/5/2006 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OBJECTIONS to PROPOSED STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT by Arkansas Public Employees Retirement System. (King, Laurence) (Filed on 8/17/2006) (Entered: 08/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 8/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION Amended Stipulation Of Settlement by Stephen Knee. (Schofield, Kathryn) (Filed on 8/10/2006) (Entered: 08/10/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 7/25/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 100 MOTION for Settlement. Motion Hearing set for 8/18/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/25/06. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2006) (Entered: 07/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 7/24/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Continuing Preliminary Settlement Hearing by Christopher B. Paisley, David L. House, Nicholas G. Moore, L. William Krause, Sanjay Vaswani, Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., Michael Klayko, Seth D. Neiman, Neal Dempsey. (Oakes, Mark) (Filed on 7/24/2006) (Entered: 07/24/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 7/20/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re 103 Stipulation filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.,, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 103 Stipulation, 100 MOTION for Settlement. Motion Hearing set for 8/4/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/20/06. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2006) (Entered: 07/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 7/19/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION Continuing Preliminary Settlement Hearing by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Oakes, Mark) (Filed on 7/19/2006) (Entered: 07/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 7/11/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing Motion Hearing set for 7/21/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2006) (Entered: 07/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Continuing Preliminary Settlement Hearing by Christopher B. Paisley, David L. House, Nicholas G. Moore, L. William Krause, Sanjay Vaswani, Robert R. Walker, Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., Michael Klayko, Seth D. Neiman, Neal Dempsey. (Oakes, Mark) (Filed on 7/7/2006) (Entered: 07/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 6/13/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Settlement CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 99 filed by Stephen Knee. Motion Hearing set for 7/14/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1)(Schofield, Kathryn) (Filed on 6/13/2006) (Entered: 06/13/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 100 . *** MOTION for Settlement CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 98 filed by Stephen Knee. Motion Hearing set for 7/14/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1)(Schofield, Kathryn) (Filed on 6/12/2006) Modified on 6/13/2006 (ewn, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 6/9/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 99 . *** MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement filed by Stephen Knee. Motion Hearing set for 7/14/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 # 2)(Alexander, Mary) (Filed on 6/9/2006) Modified on 6/13/2006 (ewn, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 5/15/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re 94 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Antonio Canova,, Attorney Norman J. Blears for Antonio Canova, Alexander M.R. Lyon for Antonio Canova, Matthew C. Holohan for Antonio Canova added. Attorney Cameron Powers Hoffman; Nina F. Locker; David Andrew McCarthy; Steven Guggenheim and Caz Hashemi terminated.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/13/06. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2006) (Entered: 05/15/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 5/12/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Christopher B. Paisley, David L. House, Nicholas G. Moore, L. William Krause, Sanjay Vaswani, Robert R. Walker, Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., Michael Klayko, Seth D. Neiman, Neal Dempsey (Oakes, Mark) (Filed on 5/12/2006) (Entered: 05/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 5/12/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Amended Complaint Deadline by Christopher B. Paisley, David L. House, Nicholas G. Moore, L. William Krause, Sanjay Vaswani, Robert R. Walker, Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., Michael Klayko, Seth D. Neiman, Neal Dempsey. (Oakes, Mark) (Filed on 5/12/2006) (Entered: 05/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 5/11/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Alexander M.R. Lyon and Norman J. Blears for Antonio Canova (Lyon, Alexander) (Filed on 5/11/2006) (Entered: 05/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 5/1/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Regarding Amended Complaint Deadline re 91 Stipulation, filed by Robert R. Walker,, Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.,, Seth D. Neiman,, Neal Dempsey,, Christopher B. Paisley,, David L. House,, Nicholas G. Moore,, L. William Krause,, Sanjay Vaswani,, Michael Klayko,. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/01/06. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2006) (Entered: 05/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 4/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Christopher B. Paisley, David L. House, Nicholas G. Moore, L. William Krause, Sanjay Vaswani, Robert R. Walker, Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., Michael Klayko, Seth D. Neiman, Neal Dempsey re 91 Stipulation, (Hoffman, Cameron) (Filed on 4/28/2006) (Entered: 04/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 4/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING AMENDED COMPLAINT DEADLINE by Christopher B. Paisley, David L. House, Nicholas G. Moore, L. William Krause, Sanjay Vaswani, Robert R. Walker, Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., Michael Klayko, Seth D. Neiman, Neal Dempsey. (Hoffman, Cameron) (Filed on 4/28/2006) (Entered: 04/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 3/28/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re 88 Stipulation, filed by Robert R. Walker,, Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.,, Seth D. Neiman,, Neal Dempsey,, Christopher B. Paisley,, David L. House,, Nicholas G. Moore,, L. William Krause,, Sanjay Vaswani,, Michael Klayko, Amended Complaint due by 4/28/2006.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/26/06. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2006) (Entered: 03/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 3/24/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Christopher B. Paisley, David L. House, Nicholas G. Moore, L. William Krause, Sanjay Vaswani, Robert R. Walker, Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., Michael Klayko, Seth D. Neiman, Neal Dempsey re 88 Stipulation, and [Proposed] Order Regarding Amended Complaint Deadline (Oakes, Mark) (Filed on 3/24/2006) (Entered: 03/24/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 3/24/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Amended Complaint Deadline by Christopher B. Paisley, David L. House, Nicholas G. Moore, L. William Krause, Sanjay Vaswani, Robert R. Walker, Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., Michael Klayko, Seth D. Neiman, Neal Dempsey. (Oakes, Mark) (Filed on 3/24/2006) (Entered: 03/24/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 3/8/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re 85 Stipulation, filed by Robert R. Walker,, Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.,, Seth D. Neiman,, Neal Dempsey,, Christopher B. Paisley,, David L. House,, Nicholas G. Moore,, L. William Krause,, Sanjay Vaswani, Amended Complaint due by 3/28/2006.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/7/06. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2006) (Entered: 03/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 3/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Christopher B. Paisley, David L. House, Nicholas G. Moore, L. William Krause, Sanjay Vaswani, Robert R. Walker, Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., Michael Klayko, Seth D. Neiman, Neal Dempsey re 85 Stipulation, and [Proposed] Order re Amended Complaint Deadline (Oakes, Mark) (Filed on 3/6/2006) (Entered: 03/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 3/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Amended Complaint Deadline by Christopher B. Paisley, David L. House, Nicholas G. Moore, L. William Krause, Sanjay Vaswani, Robert R. Walker, Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., Seth D. Neiman, Neal Dempsey. (Oakes, Mark) (Filed on 3/6/2006) (Entered: 03/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 2/16/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/6/06 before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter: Sahar McVickar. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2006) (Entered: 02/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 1/23/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER re 81 Stipulation, filed by Robert R. Walker,, Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.,, Seth D. Neiman,, Neal Dempsey,, Christopher B. Paisley,, David L. House,, Nicholas G. Moore,, L. William Krause,, Sanjay Vaswani,, Michael Klayko,. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/23/06. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2006) (Entered: 01/23/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 1/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Christopher B. Paisley, David L. House, Nicholas G. Moore, L. William Krause, Sanjay Vaswani, Robert R. Walker, Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., Michael Klayko, Seth D. Neiman, Neal Dempsey re 81 Stipulation, (Hoffman, Cameron) (Filed on 1/20/2006) (Entered: 01/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 1/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING ADR CERTIFICATION DEADLINES by Christopher B. Paisley, David L. House, Nicholas G. Moore, L. William Krause, Sanjay Vaswani, Robert R. Walker, Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., Michael Klayko, Seth D. Neiman, Neal Dempsey. (Hoffman, Cameron) (Filed on 1/20/2006) (Entered: 01/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 61 Motion for Protective Order (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2006) (Entered: 01/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 1/6/2006 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 1/6/2006) re 45 MOTION for Joinder of Gregory Reyes in Nominal Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by Gregory L. Reyes,, 47 MOTION to Dismiss of Nominal Defendant Brocade Communications Systems, Inc. to the Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.,, 61 MOTION for Protective Order Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion for Protective Order Staying Discovery filed by Robert R. Walker,, Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.,, Antonio Canova,, Seth D. Neiman,, Neal Dempsey,, Christopher B. Paisley,, David L. House,, Nicholas G. Moore,, L. William Krause,, Sanjay Vaswani,, Michael Klayko,, 51 MOTION for Joinder by Individual Defendants to Nominal Defendant Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by Robert R. Walker,, Antonio Canova,, Seth D. Neiman,, Neal Dempsey,, Christopher B. Paisley,, David L. House,, Nicholas G. Moore,, L. William Krause,, Sanjay Vaswani,, Michael Klayko,. (Court Reporter Sahar McVickar.) The Court grants motion to dismiss with leave to AMEND. Amended Complaint filed within 60 days. (be, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/6/2006) Modified on 1/10/2006 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 1/5/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gregory L. Reyes re 77 Notice of Substitution of Counsel (Yadegar, Navid) (Filed on 1/5/2006) (Entered: 01/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 1/5/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Navid Yadegar and Notice of Change of Law Firm Association (Yadegar, Navid) (Filed on 1/5/2006) (Entered: 01/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Reply Memorandum Nominal Defendant Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.'s Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Complaint filed byBrocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Hoffman, Cameron) (Filed on 12/16/2005) (Entered: 12/16/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Christopher B. Paisley, David L. House, Nicholas G. Moore, L. William Krause, Sanjay Vaswani, Robert R. Walker, Michael Klayko, Antonio Canova, Seth D. Neiman, Neal Dempsey re 74 Joinder,, Notice of Joinder and Joinder by Individual Defendants to Nominal Defendant's Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Complaint (Hoffman, Cameron) (Filed on 12/16/2005) (Entered: 12/16/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joinder Notice of Joinder and Joinder by Individual Defendants to Nominal Defendant's Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Complaint by Christopher B. Paisley, David L. House, Nicholas G. Moore, L. William Krause, Sanjay Vaswani, Robert R. Walker, Michael Klayko, Antonio Canova, Seth D. Neiman, Neal Dempsey, Christopher B. Paisley, David L. House, Nicholas G. Moore, L. William Krause, Sanjay Vaswani, Robert R. Walker, Michael Klayko, Antonio Canova, Seth D. Neiman, Neal Dempsey. (Hoffman, Cameron) (Filed on 12/16/2005) (Entered: 12/16/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Christopher B. Paisley, David L. House, Nicholas G. Moore, L. William Krause, Sanjay Vaswani, Robert R. Walker, Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., Michael Klayko, Antonio Canova, Seth D. Neiman, Neal Dempsey re 72 Reply Memorandum, Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion for Protective Order Staying Discovery (Hoffman, Cameron) (Filed on 12/16/2005) (Entered: 12/16/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Reply Memorandum Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion for Protective Order Staying Discovery filed byChristopher B. Paisley, David L. House, Nicholas G. Moore, L. William Krause, Sanjay Vaswani, Robert R. Walker, Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., Michael Klayko, Antonio Canova, Seth D. Neiman, Neal Dempsey. (Hoffman, Cameron) (Filed on 12/16/2005) (Entered: 12/16/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc. re 70 Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Complaint (Hoffman, Cameron) (Filed on 12/16/2005) (Entered: 12/16/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 76 . *** Reply Memorandum Nominal Defendant Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.'s Reply in Support off Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Complaint filed byBrocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Hoffman, Cameron) (Filed on 12/16/2005) Modified on 12/19/2005 (ewn, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/16/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Gregory L. Reyes of Joinder and Joinder of Gregory Reyes in Defendants' Reply in Further Support of the Motion for Protective Order Staying Discovery (Yadegar, Navid) (Filed on 12/16/2005) (Entered: 12/16/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Gregory L. Reyes of Joinder and Joinder of Gregory Reyes in Defendants' Reply in Further Support of the Motion to Dismiss (Yadegar, Navid) (Filed on 12/16/2005) (Entered: 12/16/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 12/2/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Oppostion to Defendants' Motion for Protective Order Staying Discovery filed byStephen Knee. (Schofield, Kathryn) (Filed on 12/2/2005) (Entered: 12/02/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT re 43 Amended Complaint, 44 Amended Complaint Verification of Anjani K. Jha by Stephen Knee. (Plutzik, Alan) (Filed on 12/1/2005) (Entered: 12/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/29/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Complaint filed byStephen Knee. (Attachments: # 1 Verification# 2)(Alexander, Mary) (Filed on 11/29/2005) (Entered: 11/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Gregory L. Reyes of Joinder in Defendants' Motion for Protective Order Staying Discovery (Yadegar, Navid) (Filed on 11/18/2005) (Entered: 11/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Christopher B. Paisley, David L. House, Nicholas G. Moore, L. William Krause, Sanjay Vaswani, Robert R. Walker, Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., Michael Klayko, Antonio Canova, Seth D. Neiman, Neal Dempsey re 61 MOTION for Protective Order Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion for Protective Order Staying Discovery, 62 proposed Order. (Oakes, Mark) (Filed on 11/18/2005) Modified on 11/21/2005 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Order re 61 MOTION for Protective Order Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion for Protective Order Staying Discovery by Christopher B. Paisley, David L. House, Nicholas G. Moore, L. William Krause, Sanjay Vaswani, Robert R. Walker, Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., Michael Klayko, Antonio Canova, Seth D. Neiman, Neal Dempsey. (Oakes, Mark) (Filed on 11/18/2005) (Entered: 11/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Protective Order Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion for Protective Order Staying Discovery filed by Christopher B. Paisley, David L. House, Nicholas G. Moore, L. William Krause, Sanjay Vaswani, Robert R. Walker, Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., Michael Klayko, Antonio Canova, Seth D. Neiman, Neal Dempsey. Motion Hearing set for 1/6/2006 10:00 AM. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Oakes, Mark) (Filed on 11/18/2005) (Entered: 11/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 11/15/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re 57 Stipulation filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.,, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 57 Stipulation. Motion due 11/18/2005. Responses due by 12/2/2005. Replies due by 12/16/2005. Motion Hearing set for 1/6/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/15/05. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2005) (Entered: 11/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 11/14/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER re 56 Stipulation filed by Stephen Knee,, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 56 Stipulation, 51 MOTION for Joinder by Individual Defendants to Nominal Defendant Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Complaint, 45 MOTION for Joinder of Gregory Reyes in Nominal Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Complaint, 47 MOTION to Dismiss of Nominal Defendant Brocade Communications Systems, Inc. to the Consolidated Amended Complaint. Responses due by 11/29/2005. Replies due by 12/16/2005. Motion Hearing set for 1/6/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/11/05. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2005) (Entered: 11/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/10/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc. re 57 Stipulation (Hoffman, Cameron) (Filed on 11/10/2005) (Entered: 11/10/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/10/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING HEARING DATE AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANTS' INTENDED MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Hoffman, Cameron) (Filed on 11/10/2005) (Entered: 11/10/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/7/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Continuing Hearing Scheduled for December 2, 2005, Establishing Briefing Schedule and Postponement of ADR Certification by Stephen Knee. (Schofield, Kathryn) (Filed on 11/7/2005) (Entered: 11/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/31/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re 53 Stipulation filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.,. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/31/05. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2005) (Entered: 10/31/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc. re 53 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order (McCarthy, David) (Filed on 10/28/2005) (Entered: 10/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (McCarthy, David) (Filed on 10/28/2005) (Entered: 10/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/27/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Christopher B. Paisley, David L. House, Nicholas G. Moore, L. William Krause, Sanjay Vaswani, Robert R. Walker, Michael Klayko, Antonio Canova, Seth D. Neiman, Neal Dempsey re 51 MOTION for Joinder by Individual Defendants to Nominal Defendant Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Complaint (Hoffman, Cameron) (Filed on 10/27/2005) (Entered: 10/27/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/27/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Joinder by Individual Defendants to Nominal Defendant Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by Christopher B. Paisley, David L. House, Nicholas G. Moore, L. William Krause, Sanjay Vaswani, Robert R. Walker, Michael Klayko, Antonio Canova, Seth D. Neiman, Neal Dempsey. Motion Hearing set for 12/2/2005 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Hoffman, Cameron) (Filed on 10/27/2005) (Entered: 10/27/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/27/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc. re 47 MOTION to Dismiss of Nominal Defendant Brocade Communications Systems, Inc. to the Consolidated Amended Complaint, 48 Request for Judicial Notice,, 49 Declaration in Support, (Hoffman, Cameron) (Filed on 10/27/2005) (Entered: 10/27/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/27/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Cameron P. Hoffman in Support of 47 MOTION to Dismiss of Nominal Defendant Brocade Communications Systems, Inc. to the Consolidated Amended Complaint filed byBrocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J)(Related document(s) 47 ) (Hoffman, Cameron) (Filed on 10/27/2005) (Entered: 10/27/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/27/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request for Judicial Notice re 47 MOTION to Dismiss of Nominal Defendant Brocade Communications Systems, Inc. to the Consolidated Amended Complaint filed byBrocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Related document(s) 47 ) (Hoffman, Cameron) (Filed on 10/27/2005) (Entered: 10/27/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 47 Filed: 10/27/2005, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss of Nominal Defendant Brocade Communications Systems, Inc. to the Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/2/2005 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hoffman, Cameron) (Filed on 10/27/2005) (Entered: 10/27/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/27/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of Interested Entities of Gregory Reyes (Yadegar, Navid) (Filed on 10/27/2005) (Entered: 10/27/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/27/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Joinder of Gregory Reyes in Nominal Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by Gregory L. Reyes. Motion Hearing set for 12/2/2005 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Yadegar, Navid) (Filed on 10/27/2005) (Entered: 10/27/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/7/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT PART TWO OF TWO against all defendants. Filed byStephen Knee. (Schofield, Kathryn) (Filed on 10/7/2005) (Entered: 10/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/7/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT (PART ONE OF TWO) against all defendants. Filed byStephen Knee. (Schofield, Kathryn) (Filed on 10/7/2005) (Entered: 10/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/5/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CLERK'S NOTICE re: Failure to E-File and/or Failure to Register as an E-Filer (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2005) (Entered: 10/05/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/3/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joinder re 37 Memorandum in Opposition, by Gregory L. Reyes.(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2005) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/11/2005 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/05/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/3/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 34 Ex Parte Application. Plainitffs shall file the amended complaint by 10/7/05. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2005) Modified on 10/4/2005 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/03/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/30/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Brief Derivative Plaintiffs' Memorandum on Consolidation with the Securities Case, Leadership Structure and Discovery Coordination filed byStephen Knee. (Schofield, Kathryn) (Filed on 9/30/2005) (Entered: 09/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/22/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc. re 37 Memorandum in Opposition, to Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application to Extend Time to File Consolidated Amended Complaint (McCarthy, David) (Filed on 9/22/2005) (Entered: 09/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/22/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in Opposition re 34 First Ex Parte Application and Order Extending Time to File Consolidated Amended Complaint Nominal Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application to Extend Time to File Consolidated Amended Complaint filed byBrocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McCarthy, David) (Filed on 9/22/2005) (Entered: 09/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/20/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Stephen Knee (Schofield, Kathryn) (Filed on 9/20/2005) (Entered: 09/20/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/20/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Alan R. Plutzik in Support of Ex Parte Application and Order Extending Time to File Consolidated Amended Complaint filed byStephen Knee. (Schofield, Kathryn) (Filed on 9/20/2005) (Entered: 09/20/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/20/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    First Ex Parte Application and Order Extending Time to File Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by Stephen Knee. (Schofield, Kathryn) (Filed on 9/20/2005) (Entered: 09/20/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/15/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re 32 Stipulation filed by Stephen Knee,. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/14/05. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2005) (Entered: 09/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/12/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION and [Proposed] Reschedule by Stephen Knee. (Plutzik, Alan) (Filed on 9/12/2005) (Entered: 09/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/22/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Consolidating All Derivative Actions and Appointing Leadership Structure for Plaintiffs re 29 Stipulation filed by Stephen Knee. MASTER FILED SHALL BE CASE NO. C-05-2233CRB. Co-Lead Counsel are: Farui
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/17/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 26 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2005) (Entered: 08/17/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/16/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION Amended Stipulation and [Proposed] Pretrial Order No. 1 Consolidating All Related Shareholder Derivative Actions and Appointing Leadership Structure for Plaintiffs by Stephen Knee. (Schofield, Kathryn) (Filed on 8/16/2005) (Entered: 08/16/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/16/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Stephen Knee. Service waived by Gregory L. Reyes waiver sent on 8/3/2005, answer due 10/3/2005. (Schofield, Kathryn) (Filed on 8/16/2005) (Entered: 08/16/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/15/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Stephen Knee re 26 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, Received Order (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2005) (Entered: 08/16/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/15/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of attorney Adam Gonnelli filed by Stephen Knee. FEE PAID. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2005) (Entered: 08/16/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/15/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION and [Proposed] Pretrial Order No. 1 Consolidating All Related Shareholder Derivative Actions and Appointing Leadership Structure for Plaintiffs by Stephen Knee. (Schofield, Kathryn) (Filed on 8/15/2005) (Entered: 08/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/9/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER postponing case management conference re 23 Stipulation filed by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.,. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/09/05. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2005) (Entered: 08/09/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/8/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Postponing Case Management Conference by Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.. (McCarthy, David) (Filed on 8/8/2005) (Entered: 08/08/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/2/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 7 First MOTION to Consolidate Cases All Related Shareholder Derivative Actions and Appoint a Leadership Structure for Plaintiffs: Motion Hearing set for 9/2/2005 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/01/05. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2005) (Entered: 08/02/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Stephen Knee re 15 Clerks Notice Continuing Motion Hearing, 19 First MOTION for Hearing re 7 First MOTION to Consolidate Cases All Related Shareholder Derivative Actions and Appoint a Leadership Structure for Plaintiffs, 15 Clerks Notice Continuing Motion Hearing Emergency Motion to Change the Hearing, 20 Declaration in Support,,,, 5 Stipulation and Order (Schofield, Kathryn) (Filed on 7/28/2005) (Entered: 07/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Kathryn A. Schofield in Support of 7 First MOTION to Consolidate Cases All Related Shareholder Derivative Actions and Appoint a Leadership Structure for Plaintiffs, 15 Clerks Notice Continuing Motion Hearing, 19 First MOTION for Hearing re 7 First MOTION to Consolidate Cases All Related Shareholder Derivative Actions and Appoint a Leadership Structure for Plaintiffs, 15 Clerks Notice Continuing Motion Hearing Emergency Motion to Change the Hearing Declaration of Kathryn A. Schofield in Support of Plaintiff Knee and Galluscio's Emergency Motion to Change Date of Motion to Consolidate All Related Shareholder Derivative Actions filed byStephen Knee. (Related document(s) 7 , 15 , 19 ) (Schofield, Kathryn) (Filed on 7/28/2005) (Entered: 07/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  First MOTION for Hearing re 7 First MOTION to Consolidate Cases All Related Shareholder Derivative Actions and Appoint a Leadership Structure for Plaintiffs, 15 Clerks Notice Continuing Motion Hearing Emergency Motion to Change the Hearing Date for Plaintiffs Knee and Galluscio's Motion to Consolidate Related Shareholder Derivative Actions and Appoint Leadership Structure to September 2, 2005, Pursuant to Local Rule 6-3; Proposed Order filed by Stephen Knee. Motion Hearing set for 9/2/2005 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Schofield, Kathryn) (Filed on 7/28/2005) (Entered: 07/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Christopher B. Paisley, David L. House, Nicholas G. Moore, L. William Krause, Sanjay Vaswani, Robert R. Walker, Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., Antonio Canova, Seth D. Neiman, Neal Dempsey re 17 Statement of Non-Opposition, (McCarthy, David) (Filed on 7/8/2005) (Entered: 07/08/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statement of Non-Opposition to Plaintiffs Knee and Galluscio's Motion to Consolidate all Related Shareholder Derivative Actions and Appoint a Leadership Structure for Plaintiffs filed byChristopher B. Paisley, David L. House, Nicholas G. Moore, L. William Krause, Sanjay Vaswani, Robert R. Walker, Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., Antonio Canova, Seth D. Neiman, Neal Dempsey. (McCarthy, David) (Filed on 7/8/2005) (Entered: 07/08/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by David Andrew McCarthy Notice of Appearance of Counsel (McCarthy, David) (Filed on 7/8/2005) (Entered: 07/08/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/6/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing Motion Hearing reset for 8/5/2005 10:00 AM. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2005) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/6/2005 (be, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/06/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/5/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Stephen Knee. Service waived by Christopher B. Paisley waiver sent on 6/8/2005, answer due 8/8/2005; David L. House waiver sent on 6/8/2005, answer due 8/8/2005; Nicholas G. Moore waiver sent on 6/8/2005, answer due 8/8/2005; L. William Krause waiver sent on 6/8/2005, answer due 8/8/2005; Sanjay Vaswani waiver sent on 6/8/2005, answer due 8/8/2005; Robert R. Walker waiver sent on 6/8/2005, answer due 8/8/2005; Brocade Communications Systems, Inc. waiver sent on 6/8/2005, answer due 8/8/2005; Stephen Knee waiver sent on 6/8/2005, answer due 8/8/2005; Antonio Canova waiver sent on 6/8/2005, answer due 8/8/2005; Seth D. Neiman waiver sent on 6/8/2005, answer due 8/8/2005; Neal Dempsey waiver sent on 6/8/2005, answer due 8/8/2005. (Schofield, Kathryn) (Filed on 7/5/2005) (Entered: 07/05/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/1/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Stephen Knee re 12 Clerks Notice , Order Setting CMC and Standing Orders (Schofield, Kathryn) (Filed on 7/1/2005) (Entered: 07/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/29/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CLERK'S NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 8/19/2005 08:30 AM. (Attachments: # 1 Order Setting Case Management Conference# 2 Standing Order) (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2005) (Entered: 06/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Stephen Knee (Schofield, Kathryn) (Filed on 6/24/2005) (Entered: 06/24/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Order Pretrial Order No. 1 Consolidating All Related Shareholder Derivative Actions and Appointing Leadership Structure for Plaintiffs by Stephen Knee. (Schofield, Kathryn) (Filed on 6/24/2005) (Entered: 06/24/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Kathryn A. Schofield in Support of Plaintiffs Knee and Galluscio's Motion to Consolidate All Related Shareholder Derivative Actions and Appoint a Leadership Structure for Plaintiffs filed byStephen Knee. (Schofield, Kathryn) (Filed on 6/24/2005) (Entered: 06/24/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support of Plaintiffs Knee and Galluscio's Motion to Consolidate All Related Shareholder Derivative Actions and Appoint a Leadership Structure for Plaintiffs filed byStephen Knee. (Schofield, Kathryn) (Filed on 6/24/2005) (Entered: 06/24/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          First MOTION to Consolidate Cases All Related Shareholder Derivative Actions and Appoint a Leadership Structure for Plaintiffs filed by Stephen Knee. Motion Hearing set for 7/29/2005 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Schofield, Kathryn) (Filed on 6/24/2005) (Entered: 06/24/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/23/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER RELATING CASE C-05-2139JSW, C05-2233BZ,C-05-2235MJJ, C-05-2316MJJ, C05-2372MHP and C-05-2396WHA to lead case C-05-2042CRB. Case reassigned to Judge Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/22/05. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2005) (Entered: 06/23/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/22/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER regarding derivative related cases. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/22/05. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2005) (Entered: 06/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/22/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER regaring derivative related cases. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/22/05. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2005) (Entered: 06/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/1/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF RELATED CASES to C-05-2042-CRB
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/1/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due 9/26/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/1/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      VERIFIED DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT For Breach of Fiduciary Duty, Abuse of Control, Gross Mismanagement, Waste of Corporate Assets
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space Space

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 308 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?