Kyocera Corporation et al v. Norman IP Holdings, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Southern District Court, Case No. 3:10-cv-00836-JM-BGS
District Judge Jeffrey T. Miller, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 10, 2016 at 2:52 PM DT (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Kyocera Communications, Inc. Kyocera Communications, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Livornese Law Group LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Don Francis Livornese +1 310 356 6920 +1 310 356 6930 dlivornese@livorneselawgroup.com
Kyocera Corporation Kyocera Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Livornese Law Group LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Don Francis Livornese +1 310 356 6920 +1 310 356 6930 dlivornese@livorneselawgroup.com
v.
No Logo Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky & Popeo, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William D. Belanger +1 617 542 6000 +5422 542 542 2241 wdbelanger@mintz.com
Space Matthew D Durell +1 617 348 1615 +1 617 542 2241 mdurell@mintz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pepper Hamilton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William David Belanger +1 617 204 5101 +1 617 204 5150 belangerw@pepperlaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexandra C. Fennell +1 617 204 5158 fennella@pepperlaw.com
Space Harry P Weitzel +1 949 369 3500 +1 949 863 0151 weitzelh@pepperlaw.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 145
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
Office San Diego
Filed 4/21/2010
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Cause Section 35 U.S.C. § 145 Patent Infringement
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County San Diego
Terminated 4/18/2011
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags CLOSED,STAYED
  Entries (34) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: 4/18/2011 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
ORDER granting [33] joint Motion to Dismiss with prejudice. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 4/18/2011. (tkl) (av1).
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: 4/15/2011, Terminated: 4/18/2011 Motion to Dismiss
    Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by Kyocera Communications, Inc., Kyocera Corporation, Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Livornese, Don) (tkl).
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/25/2011, Entered: 3/25/2011 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
      ORDER denying [20] Motion to Dismiss or, alternatively, to transfer action, without prejudice. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 3/25/2011. (tkl)(jrd).
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/2/2011, Entered: 2/2/2011 Order on Motion to StayCourt Filing
        ORDER granting [30] Motion to Stay pending Settlement. It is hereby Ordered that: All dates and deadlines in this case are extended by 63 days pending finalization of settlement documents. This includes but is not limited to all dates and deadlines ascribed by the Local Rules, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and any and all dates scheduled by the Court, including the February 18, 2011 hearing on Norman's motion to dismiss/transfer as well as related briefing deadlines. (Motion Hearing set for 4/22/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 16 before Judge Jeffrey T. Miller.) Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 2/2/11. (lao) (mam).
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/2/2011, Entered: 2/2/2011, Terminated: 2/2/2011 Motion to Stay
          Joint MOTION to Stay Pending Settlement by Kyocera Communications, Inc., Kyocera Corporation, Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration)(Livornese, Don). (jah).
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/2/2011, Entered: 2/2/2011 Notice of Withdrawal of Document
            NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Kyocera Communications, Inc., Kyocera Corporation re [28] Joint MOTION to Stay Pending Settlement filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Kyocera Corporation, Kyocera Communications, Inc.. (Livornese, Don)(ag).
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/1/2011, Entered: 2/1/2011, Terminated: 2/2/2011 Motion to Stay
              DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN PER DOCUMENT NO. [29] - Joint MOTION to Stay Pending Settlement by Kyocera Communications, Inc., Kyocera Corporation, Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Don F. Livornese)(Livornese, Don) emailed attny re missing joint signature (lao). Modified on 2/3/2011 to note that the document is withdrawn (ag).
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/27/2011, Entered: 1/27/2011 OrderCourt Filing
                SHEDULING ORDER. The hearing on [20] MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative Transfer the Case to the Eastern District of Texas is set for 2/18/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 16 before Judge Jeffrey T. Miller. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 1/27/2011.(tkl)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: 8/9/2010 Order on Motion to StayCourt Filing
                  ORDER granting joint Motion to Stay [25] discovery and briefing and re-schedule hearing, re dft's motion to dismiss/transfer, pending resolution of Texas transfer motion. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 8/9/2010. (tkl) (jrl).
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/5/2010, Entered: 8/5/2010, Terminated: 8/9/2010 Motion to Stay
                    Joint MOTION to Stay re [20] MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative Transfer the Case to the Eastern District of Texas ; Stay Discovery and Briefing, and Re-schedule Hearing, re Defendant's Motion to Dismiss/Transfer, Pending Resolution of Texas Transfer Motion by Kyocera Communications, Inc., Kyocera Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Don F. Livornese)(Livornese, Don) (tkl).
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: 7/23/2010, Terminated: 8/9/2010 Motion to Stay
                      UNOPPOSED MOTION to Stay Discovery and Briefing, and Reschedule Hearing, re Defendants' Motion to Dismiss/Transfer, Pending Resolution of Texas Transfer Motion by Kyocera Communications, Inc., Kyocera Corporation. (Livornese, Don) Modified on 7/26/2010 to add unopposed (kaj).
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: 7/12/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response-ReplyCourt Filing
                        SCHEDULING ORDER. It is ORDERED that Kyocera shall have until July 23, 2010 to oppose Norman's Motion To Dismiss Or In The Alternative Transfer The Case To The Eastern District of Texas. The hearing on the motion is calendared for August 6, 2010 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 16. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 7/12/2010. (tkl) (jrl).
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/8/2010, Entered: 7/8/2010, Terminated: 7/12/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [20] MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative Transfer the Case to the Eastern District of Texas by Kyocera Communications, Inc., Kyocera Corporation. (Livornese, Don) (tkl).
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: 6/23/2010 Notice of Party With Financial Interest
                            NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Norman IP Holdings, LLC (Durell, Matthew) (tkl).
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/22/2010, Entered: 6/22/2010, Terminated: 3/25/2011 Motion to Dismiss
                              MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative Transfer the Case to the Eastern District of Texas by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix of Unpublished Decisions in Support of Motion)(Weitzel, Harry) (tkl).
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: 6/21/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                ORDER granting [18] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer to the First Amended Complaint. Norman IP Holdings, LLC answer due 6/22/2010. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 6/21/2010. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tkl) (Main Document 19 replaced and regenerated NEF on 6/21/2010) (tkl). (jrl).
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: 6/18/2010, Terminated: 6/21/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , pleading, or other response to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Weitzel, Harry) (tkl).
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: 6/18/2010 Pro Hac Vice Approved - Clerk
                                    PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: William D. Belanger appearing for Defendant Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: 6/18/2010 Pro Hac Vice Approved - Clerk
                                      PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Matthew D. Durell appearing for Defendant Norman IP Holdings, LLC (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: 6/18/2010
                                        PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Alexandra C. Fennell appearing for Defendant Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(leh)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/8/2010, Entered: 6/9/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                          ORDER granting [13] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer to First Amended Complaint. Norman IP Holdings, LLC answer due 6/18/2010. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 6/7/2010. (tkl) (jrl).
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: 6/4/2010, Terminated: 6/8/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , pleading, or other response to Plaintiffs' first amended complaint by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Weitzel, Harry). Modified on 6/7/2010 (tkl). Emailed atty re S/. on proof of service.
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/21/2010, Entered: 5/21/2010, Terminated: 6/8/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Weitzel, Harry) . Modified on 5/24/2010 (tkl). Emailed atty re S/ on proof of service. Modified on 12/10/2010 to term motion per order of 6/8/10 (nsp).
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/18/2010, Entered: 5/18/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                ORDER granting [9] joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer to complaint. Norman IP Holdings, LLC answer due 5/21/2010. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 5/18/2010. (tkl) (jrl).
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: 5/14/2010 Amended Complaint
                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Norman IP Holdings, LLC, filed by Kyocera Corporation, Kyocera Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit TOC)(Livornese, Don) (tkl).
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: 5/14/2010, Terminated: 5/18/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                    Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Weitzel, Harry) (tkl).
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/6/2010, Entered: 5/6/2010 Summons Returned Executed
                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kyocera Corporation, Kyocera Communications, Inc.. Norman IP Holdings, LLC served on 4/29/2010, answer due 5/20/2010. (Livornese, Don) (tkl).
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: 5/3/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER OF TRANSFER: Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler is no longer assigned to the case and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal is now assigned to the case. The new case number is 10cv836-JM(BGS). All conference or hearing dates set before Magistrate Judge Adler, if any, are vacated and will be rescheduled before Magistrate Judge Skomal. Any dates set before the district judge will remain unchanged. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 4/30/10.(kaj)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: 4/30/2010 Order of Transfer Pursuant to Low Number RuleCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Judge Jeffrey T. Miller and Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler for all further proceedings. Judge Roger T. Benitez, Magistrate Judge Louisa S Porter no longer assigned to case.Create association to 3:10-cv-00836-BEN -POR. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 4/28/2010. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 4/26/2010.(knh)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: 4/23/2010 Notice of Related Case
                                                            NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Kyocera Communications, Inc., Kyocera Corporation of case(s) 3:10-815 S.D. Cal.; 6:09-270 E.D. Tex (Livornese, Don) Low Number Order prepared on 4/21/10 (knh).
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: 4/21/2010 Summons Issued
                                                              Summons Issued as to Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (knh)(kaj).
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: 4/21/2010 Notice of Party With Financial Interest
                                                                NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Kyocera Communications, Inc. and Kyocera Corporation. (knh) (kaj).
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: 4/21/2010 Report Regarding Patent and Trademark
                                                                  REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent numbers *5,592,555*, *5,502,689* (jer)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: 4/21/2010 Complaint
                                                                    COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Norman IP Holdings, LLC ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 12651.), filed by Kyocera Corporation and Kyocera Communications, Inc.(jer) (jcj).
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                      Statistics

                                                                      This case has been viewed 121 times.

                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                      Space
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                       
                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                      Need Password Help?