Alward v. Public Safety
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:08-cv-01952-RNC

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 4, 2018 at 4:05 AM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Karen A. Alward, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by John O'hyun Kim, Llc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John O'hyun Kim +1 203 557 3490 jkim@johnokimlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ste. 409

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katrena K. Engstrom +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 kengstrom@johnrwilliams.com
v.
No Logo Dept Of Public Safety, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Attorney General's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Antoria D. Howard +1 860 808 5340 antoria.howard@po.state.ct.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Connecticut Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erik Thebin Lohr +1 860 808 5340 +1 860 808 5383 Erik.Lohr@ct.gov
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000e
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
  Entries (42) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Clerk's Disbursement of Funds in the amount of $500.00 Paid to Plaintiff. Ref#12461400045 (Crite, J) (Entered: 02/15/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER granting 38 Motion for Release of Bond Obligation. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 2/9/12. (Glynn, T.) (Entered: 02/09/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/7/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Consent MOTION for Release of Bond Obligation by Karen A. Alward. (Williams, John) (Entered: 02/07/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/7/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case with prejudice by Karen A. Alward, Dept of Public Safety. (Howard, Antoria) (Entered: 02/07/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/12/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER DISMISSING CASE- Case reported settled. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 1/10/12. (Glynn, T.) (Entered: 01/12/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/9/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Donna F. Martinez: Settlement Conference held on 1/9/2012. Case SETTLED. Total Time: 3 hours (Martinez, Donna) (Entered: 01/09/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/5/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              NOTICE of Appearance by Katrena K. Engstrom on behalf of Karen A. Alward (Engstrom, Katrena) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/18/2012: # 1 REPLACEMENT PDF TO ADD SIGNATURE) (Blue, A.). (Entered: 01/05/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank 33 Filed: 1/4/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ORDER: A Settlement Conference is scheduled for MONDAY 1/9/2012 at 2:00 PM in Chambers Room 262, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Donna F. Martinez. Counsel shall submit an ex parte settlement conference memorandum to chambers by NOON on Friday 1/6/12. See attached order for important instructions. Signed by Judge Donna F. Martinez on 1/4/12. (Constantine, A.) (Entered: 01/04/2012)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/4/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert N. Chatigny: Pretrial Conference held on 1/4/2012. 37 minutes(Court Reporter Warner, Darlene.) (Glynn, T.) (Entered: 01/04/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/30/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    NOTICE of Appearance by Erik Thebin Lohr on behalf of Dept of Public Safety (Lohr, Erik) (Entered: 12/30/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/20/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      ORDER granting 29 Motion to be excused from attending the final pretrial conference. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 12/20/2011. (Rickevicius, L.) (Entered: 12/20/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/18/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        MOTION Excuse Trial Counsel from Personally Attending Final Pretrial Conference re 25 Pretrial Order, by Karen A. Alward.Responses due by 1/8/2012 (Williams, John) (Entered: 12/18/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Dept of Public Safety. (Howard, Antoria) (Entered: 11/14/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            ORDER granting 26 Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 11/14/2011. (Macare, L.) (Entered: 11/14/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses by Dept of Public Safety. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses)(Howard, Antoria) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                PRETRIAL ORDER: PLEASE READ FULL TEXT OF ATTACHED ORDER. Jury selection set for 1/10/2012; final pretrial conference set for 1/4/2012 at 2:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 11/8/2011. (Macare, L.) Modified on 11/14/2011 to correct the year as 2012.(Glynn, T.). (Entered: 11/08/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/1/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  TRIAL MEMO by Karen A. Alward, Dept of Public Safety Estimated trial time Three to Four Days. (Howard, Antoria) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: The joint trial memorandum is due on or before November 1, 2011. Trial Brief due by 11/1/2011. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 10/3/2011. (Macare, L.) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank 22 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      ORDER denying 19 Motion for Summary Judgment. Please see attached ruling. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 09/30/2011. (Wittlin, M.) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/28/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        REPLY to Response to 19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Dept of Public Safety. (Howard, Antoria) (Entered: 01/28/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/17/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Memorandum in Opposition re 19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Karen A. Alward. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Material Facts, # 2 Plaintiff's Interrogatory Responses)(Williams, John) (Entered: 01/17/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/30/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            MOTION for Summary Judgment by Dept of Public Safety.Responses due by 1/20/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Statement of Material Facts, # 3 Exhibit List of Exhibits, # 4 Exhibit 1, Part 1 of 2, # 5 Exhibit 1, Part 2 of 2, # 6 Exhibit 2 through 12, # 7 Exhibit 13 through 16, # 8 Exhibit 17 through 28)(Howard, Antoria) (Entered: 12/30/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              ENDORSEMENT ORDER, ( Dispositive Motions due by 12/31/2009). Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 10/9/09. (Attachments: # 1 Letter)(Ferguson, L.) (Entered: 10/14/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/17/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                NOTICE of Appearance by John O'Hyun Kim on behalf of Karen A. Alward (Kim, John) (Entered: 09/17/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  STATUS REPORT by Dept of Public Safety. (Howard, Antoria) (Entered: 04/27/2009)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/26/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    STATUS REPORT by Karen A. Alward. (Williams, John) (Entered: 04/26/2009)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/23/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER re 13 MOTION for Extension of Time until May 15, 2009 To Respond To Defendant's Interrogatories And Requests For Production And Requests For Admission. Granted. So ordered. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 3/23/09. (Blue, A.) (Entered: 03/23/2009)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/20/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time until May 15, 2009 To Respond To Defendant's Interrogatories And Requests For Production And Requests For Admission by Karen A. Alward. (Williams, John) (Entered: 03/20/2009)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/26/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Dept of Public Safety.(Howard, Antoria) (Entered: 02/26/2009)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/29/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/1/2009 Dispositive Motions due by 10/15/2009 Status Report due by 4/27/2009 Trial Brief due by 2/1/2010, Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 1/27/09. (Blue, A.) (Entered: 01/29/2009)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Williams, John) (Entered: 01/26/2009)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                ORDER granting 7 Motion for Security for Costs. The defendant(s) having made application to the Clerk of Court for an order requiring the plaintiff(s) to deposit or file a bond with sufficient surety in the sum of $500.00 pursuant to Local Rule 83.3(a) of the Rules of Civil Procedure for the United States District of Connecticut, it is ORDERED that the plaintiff(s) herein file a bond as security for costs in this action within thirty (30) days from this date ; granting 8 MOTION for Extension of Time until February 26, 2009 to File Responsive Pleading 1 Complaint, Signed by Clerk on 1/26/09. (Blue, A.) (Entered: 01/26/2009)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time until February 26, 2009 to File Responsive Pleading 1 Complaint by Dept of Public Safety. (Howard, Antoria) (Entered: 01/23/2009)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    MOTION for Security for Costs by Dept of Public Safety. (Howard, Antoria) (Entered: 01/23/2009)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Antoria D. Howard on behalf of Dept of Public Safety (Howard, Antoria) (Entered: 01/23/2009)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/13/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Karen A. Alward. Dept of Public Safety served on 1/6/2009, answer due 1/26/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Marshal's Return, # 2 Summons)(Williams, John) (Entered: 01/13/2009)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/23/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                          ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 12/23/08. (Attachments: # 1 Notice)(Inferrera, L.) (Entered: 12/30/2008)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/23/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/21/2009 Discovery due by 6/24/2009. Signed by Clerk on 12/23/08. (Inferrera, L.) (Entered: 12/30/2008)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Blank 33 Filed: 1/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER: A Settlement Conference is scheduled for MONDAY 1/9/2012 at 2:00 PM in Chambers Room 262, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Donna F. Martinez. Counsel shall submit an ex parte settlement conference memorandum to chambers by NOON on Friday 1/6/12. See attached order for important instructions. Signed by Judge Donna F. Martinez on 1/4/12. (Constantine, A.)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/23/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Williams on behalf of Karen A. Alward (Inferrera, L.) (Entered: 12/30/2008)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Blank 22 Filed: 10/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER denying 19 Motion for Summary Judgment. Please see attached ruling. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 09/30/2011. (Wittlin, M.)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/23/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    COMPLAINT against Dept of Public Safety ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number N0236346), filed by Karen A. Alward.(Inferrera, L.) (Entered: 12/30/2008)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                      This case has been viewed 15 times.

                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                      Space
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                       
                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                      Need Password Help?