Paul v. Bank of America, N.A.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:11-cv-00081
District Judge Janet C. Hall, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 27, 2017 at 7:31 AM DT (4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Joseph L. Paul, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
v.
Bank of America, NA Bank of America, NA, Defendant
Unknown Role, Oneida Ltd.
Unknown Role, NATIONSBANK CORP
Unknown Role, Nb Holdings Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Edwards Wildman Palmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Gerard Stretton +1 203 353 6844 +1 800 232 0862 jstretton@edwardsangell.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Siobhan M. Sweeney +1 617 517 5596 +1 888 325 9182 ssweeney@eapdlaw.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
  Entries (38) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 38 Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
AMENDED RULING re 22 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Bank of America, N.A.. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 11/16/2011. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 11/16/2011)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
    NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Trial Brief due by 12/15/2011. Bench Trial set for 5/2/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom Two, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall. Pretrial Conference set for 4/16/2012 04:00 PM in Courtroom Two, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall (DeRubeis, B.) (Entered: 11/15/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
      Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Janet C. Hall: Calendar Call held on 11/15/2011, denying 33 MOTION for Reconsideration re 31 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Bank of America, N.A. Bench trial set for 5/2/2012, Pretrial Memorandum due by 12/15/2011. Total time: 15 minutes(Court Reporter Terri Fidanza.) (DeRubeis, B.) (Entered: 11/15/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None
        Memorandum in Opposition re 33 MOTION for Reconsideration re 31 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Joseph L. Paul. (Williams, John) (Entered: 11/08/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None
          Memorandum in Support re 33 MOTION for Reconsideration re 31 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Bank of America, N.A.. (Sweeney, Siobhan) (Entered: 11/07/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None
            MOTION for Reconsideration re 31 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment by Bank of America, N.A..Responses due by 11/28/2011 (Sweeney, Siobhan) (Entered: 11/07/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
              NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Calendar Call set for 11/15/2011 12:00 PM in Courtroom Two, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall. Please read and comply with attached Notice to Counsel. (DeRubeis, B.) (Entered: 10/27/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                RULING granting in part and denying in part 22 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/24/2011. (Payton, R.) (Entered: 10/24/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/22/2011, Entered: None
                  RESPONSE re 28 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Reply to Plaintiff's Local Rule 56 Statement filed by Bank of America, N.A.. (Sweeney, Siobhan) (Entered: 04/22/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/22/2011, Entered: None
                    REPLY to Response to 22 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Complaint)(Sweeney, Siobhan) (Entered: 04/22/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/8/2011, Entered: None
                      Memorandum in Opposition re 22 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Joseph L. Paul. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Material Facts, # 2 Exhibits A - E)(Williams, John) (Entered: 04/08/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None
                        Statement of Material Facts re 22 MOTION for Summary Judgment Ex. A to LR 56(a)1 Statement Part 2 of 2 filed by Bank of America, N.A.. (Sweeney, Siobhan) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None
                          Statement of Material Facts re 22 MOTION for Summary Judgment Ex A to LR 56(a)1 Statement Part 1 of 2 filed by Bank of America, N.A.. (Sweeney, Siobhan) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None
                            Statement of Material Facts re 22 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Bank of America, N.A.. (Sweeney, Siobhan) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None
                              AFFIDAVIT re 22 MOTION for Summary Judgment Signed By Margaret Scopelianos filed by Bank of America, N.A.. (Sweeney, Siobhan) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None
                                Memorandum in Support re 22 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Sweeney, Siobhan) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                  MOTION for Summary Judgment by Bank of America, N.A..Responses due by 4/8/2011 (Sweeney, Siobhan) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Janet C. Hall: Telephonic Status Conference held on 2/23/2011. Dispositive Motions due by 3/18/2011. 5 minutes. (Court Reporter T. Fidanza) (Tebbs, J.). (Entered: 02/23/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Telephonic Status Conference has been changed to 2/23/2011 02:30 PM in Chambers Room 417, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall. Counsel are requested to participate in this conference, via telephone. This conference call is to be arranged between counsel. Once all parties are on the line, please telephone chambers at (203) 579-5554. (DeRubeis, B.) (Entered: 02/16/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER granting 18 Consent MOTION to Continue Teleconference by Joseph L. Paul. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 2/16/2011. (DeRubeis, B.) (Entered: 02/16/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/15/2011, Entered: None
                                          Consent MOTION to Continue Teleconference by Joseph L. Paul. (Williams, John) (Entered: 02/15/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Telephonic Status Conference set for 2/17/2011 12:00 PM in Chambers Room 417, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall. Counsel are requested to participate in this conference, via telephone. This conference call is to be arranged between counsel. Once all parties are on the line, please telephone chambers at (203) 579-5554. (DeRubeis, B.) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None
                                              REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Sweeney, Siobhan) (Entered: 02/07/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Siobhan M. Sweeney on behalf of Bank of America, N.A. (Sweeney, Siobhan) (Entered: 02/03/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                  ORDER granting 13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice re: Attorney Siobhan M. Sweeney for Bank of America, N.A. added. Signed by Clerk on 1/25/2011. (Heard, J.) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                    MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice re: Attorney Siobhan M. Sweeney. Filing Fee $25.00. Receipt Number CTXB00000233, by Bank of America, N.A. (Heard, J.) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE by Bank of America, N.A. regarding case removed from Superior Court (Stretton, John) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                        ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Bank of America, N.A..(Stretton, John) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel initiating or removing this action is responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Bank of America, N.A., 9 Standing Protective Order, 4 Notice of No Pending Motions filed by Bank of America, N.A., 5 Notice to State Court filed by Bank of America, N.A., 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Bank of America, N.A., 7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 8 Electronic Filing Order, 1 Notice of Removal filed by Bank of America, N.A., 6 Certificate of Service filed by Bank of America, N.A.. Signed by Clerk on 1/14/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Removal Standing Order)(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 1/14/2011. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 1/14/2011. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 4/14/2011. Amended Pleadings due by 3/15/2011. Discovery due by 7/16/2011. Dispositive Motions due by 8/15/2011. Signed by Clerk on 1/14/2011. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bank of America, N.A. re 5 Notice to State Court, 1 Notice of Removal (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE TO STATE COURT by Bank of America, N.A. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE OF NO PENDING MOTIONS by Bank of America, N.A. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by John Gerard Stretton on behalf of Bank of America, N.A. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                          Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank of America, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation for Bank of America, N.A. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court, Bridgeport, filed by Bank of America, N.A. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                              Statistics

                                                                              This case has been viewed 202 times.

                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                              Space
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                               
                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                              Need Password Help?