ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:04-cv-02164
District Judge Henry H. Kennedy, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Electronic Privacy Information Center, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Electronic Frontier Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marcia Clare Hofmann +1 415 436 9333 +1 415 436 9993 marcia@eff.org
v.
United States Department of Justice United States Department of Justice, Defendant
Officially listed as "DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Bryce +1 202 616 8335 +1 202 616 8470 peter.bryce@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 552
Nature of Suit 895 - Freedom of Information Act
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/22/2006, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (Hofmann, Marcia) (Entered: 02/22/2006)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/30/2006, Entered: None
    Memorandum in opposition to re 19 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Please see Document No. 22 for scanned image). (nmw, ) (Entered: 01/31/2006)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/30/2006, Entered: None
      REPLY to opposition to motion re 16 Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross Motion filed by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit (Supplemental) of David M. Hardy)(Bryce, Peter) Modified on 1/31/2006 (nmw, ). (Entered: 01/30/2006)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/3/2006, Entered: None
        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply/Opposition by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Bryce, Peter) (Entered: 01/03/2006)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: None
          Memorandum in opposition to re 16 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (part 1)# 2 Exhibit 1 (part 2)# 3 Exhibit 2# 4 Exhibit 3)(Hofmann, Marcia) (Entered: 12/12/2005)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: None
            Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (part 1)# 2 Exhibit 1 (part 2)# 3 Exhibit 2# 4 Exhibit 3# 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Hofmann, Marcia) (Entered: 12/12/2005)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: None
              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to 16 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hofmann, Marcia) Modified on 12/6/2005 (lc, ). (Entered: 12/05/2005)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/27/2005, Entered: None
                ERRATA re 16 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Nancy L. Steward)(Bryce, Peter) Modified on 10/28/2005 (lc, ). (Entered: 10/27/2005)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/25/2005, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                  MOTION for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of David M. Hardy ("Hardy Decl.")# 2 Exhibit A-D to Hardy Decl.# 3 Exhibit E to Hardy Decl. (part 1)# 4 Exhibit E to Hardy Decl. (part 2)# 5 Exhibit E to Hardy Decl. (part 3)# 6 Exhibit E to Hardy Decl. (part 4)# 7 Exhibit E to Hardy Decl. (part 5)# 8 Exhibit E to Hardy Decl. (part 6)# 9 Exhibit E to Hardy Decl. (part 7)# 10 Exhibit E to Hardy Decl. (part 8)# 11 Exhibit E to Hardy Decl. (part 9)# 12 Exhibit E to Hardy Decl. (part 10)# 13 Exhibit E to Hardy Decl. (part 11)# 14 Statement of Facts # 15 Text of Proposed Order)(Bryce, Peter) (Entered: 10/25/2005)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/3/2005, Entered: None
                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Brief Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Bryce, Peter) (Entered: 10/03/2005)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/24/2005, Entered: None
                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Brief Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Bryce, Peter) (Entered: 08/24/2005)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/7/2005, Entered: None
                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Summary Judgment Briefs by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Bryce, Peter) (Entered: 07/07/2005)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/22/2005, Entered: None
                          STATUS REPORT of the Parties by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Bryce, Peter) (Entered: 04/22/2005)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/31/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                            Order for Initial Scheduling Conference: Initial scheduling conference set for April 27, 2005, at 10:00 a.m., before Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on March 31, 2005. (FL, ) (Entered: 03/31/2005)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: None
                              Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File an Answer Nunc Pro Tunc by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Bryce, Peter) (Entered: 02/18/2005)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: None
                                ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Bryce, Peter) (Entered: 02/18/2005)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/4/2005, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER re Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Hofmann, Marcia) (Entered: 01/04/2005)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Blank 7 Filed: 1/3/2005, Entered: None
                                    STIPULATION Regarding Withdrawal of Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Bryce, Peter) (Entered: 01/03/2005)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/21/2004, Entered: None
                                      Joint MOTION for Order Setting Briefing Schedule on Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Bryce, Peter) (Entered: 12/21/2004)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/20/2004, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Bryce on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Bryce, Peter) (Entered: 12/20/2004)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Blank 4 Filed: 12/15/2004, Entered: None
                                          MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Hofman declaration# 2 Exhibit 1# 3 Exhibit 2# 4 Exhibit 3# 5 Exhibit 4# 6 Exhibit 5# 7 Exhibit 6# 8 Exhibit 7# 9 Exhibit 8)(lc, ) (Entered: 12/17/2004)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/15/2004, Entered: None
                                            LCvR 7.1 - CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER (lc, ) (Entered: 12/17/2004)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/15/2004, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. Case related to Case No. 04-1736. (lc, ) (Entered: 12/17/2004)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/15/2004, Entered: None
                                                COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Filing fee $ 150) filed by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER.(lc, ) (Entered: 12/17/2004)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 98 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?