NATIONAL ASSOC. v. US ARMY CORPS/ENG.
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-00274
District Judge James Robertson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 15, 2019 at 5:44 AM ST (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo AMERICAN ROAD AND TRANSPORATION BUILDERS ASSOCIATION, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rafe Petersen +1 202 419 2481 +1 202 955 5564 rafe.petersen@hklaw.com
No Logo National Association of Home Builders, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hunton & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Virginia S. Albrecht +1 202 955 1500 valbrecht@hunton.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karma B. Brown +1 202 955 1893 +1 202 778 2201 kbbrown@hunton.com
No Logo National Stone, Sand And Gravel Association, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rafe Petersen +1 202 419 2481 +1 202 955 5564 rafe.petersen@hklaw.com
No Logo NATIONWIDE PUBLIC PROJECTS COALITION, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rafe Petersen +1 202 419 2481 +1 202 955 5564 rafe.petersen@hklaw.com
v.
No Logo CHRISTINE TODD WHITMAN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Jeffrey Jordan +1 202 514 9275 +1 202 514 8865 scott.jordan@usdoj.gov
United States Environmental Protection Agency United States Environmental Protection Agency, Defendant
Officially listed as "ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Jeffrey Jordan +1 202 514 9275 +1 202 514 8865 scott.jordan@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Angeline Purdy +1 202 514 0996 +1 202 514 8865 angeline.purdy@usdoj.gov
No Logo JOSEPH WESTPHAL, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Jeffrey Jordan +1 202 514 9275 +1 202 514 8865 scott.jordan@usdoj.gov
No Logo ROBERT B. FLOWERS, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Jeffrey Jordan +1 202 514 9275 +1 202 514 8865 scott.jordan@usdoj.gov
No Logo United States Army Corps of Engineers, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Jeffrey Jordan +1 202 514 9275 +1 202 514 8865 scott.jordan@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Angeline Purdy +1 202 514 0996 +1 202 514 8865 angeline.purdy@usdoj.gov
No Logo National Wildlife Federation, Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by EARTHJUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Howard I. Fox +1 202 363 2765 +1 202 667 2356 hfox@earthjustice.org
No Logo NORTH CAROLINA WILDLIFE FEDERATION, Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by EARTHJUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Howard I. Fox +1 202 363 2765 +1 202 667 2356 hfox@earthjustice.org
No Logo Sierra Club, Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by EARTHJUSTICE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Howard I. Fox +1 202 363 2765 +1 202 667 2356 hfox@earthjustice.org
No Logo Pacific Legal Foundation, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Birch, Horton, Bittner & Cherot

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William P. Horn +1 202 659 5800 +1 202 659 1027 whorn@dc.bhb.com
Citation Section 33 U.S.C. § 1319
Nature of Suit 893 - Environmental Matters
  Entries (83) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/21/2007, Entered: 6/21/2007 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by NATIONAL STONE, SAND & GRAVEL ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN ROAD AND TRANSPORATION BUILDERS ASSOCIATION, NATIONWIDE PUBLIC PROJECTS COALITION re 72 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Memorandum in Support (Liebesman, Lawrence) (Entered: 06/21/2007)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 6/19/2007 Order
    ORDER of USCA (certified copy) that the motion by appellants' to dismiss appeal be granted. This case is hereby dismissed re 75 Notice of Appeal, filed by NORTH CAROLINA WILDLIFE FEDERATION, NATIONAL WILDLIFE FEDERATION, SIERRA CLUB. (erd) (Entered: 06/19/2007)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 5/15/2007, Entered: 5/15/2007 Motion to Withdraw
      MOTION to Withdraw (76 in 1:01-cv-00274-JR) MOTION to Enforce Motion for an Order to Clarify or Strike by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS Associated Cases: 1:01-cv-00274-JR, 1:01-cv-00320-JR(Brown, Karma) (Entered: 05/15/2007)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/15/2007, Entered: 5/15/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to (72 in 1:01-cv-00274-JR) MOTION for Attorney Fees and Memorandum in Support by UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY Associated Cases: 1:01-cv-00274-JR, 1:01-cv-00320-JR(Purdy, Angeline) (Entered: 05/15/2007)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 4/24/2007, Entered: 4/24/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Natl. Assn. of Home Builders' Motion to Clarify or Strike by NATIONAL WILDLIFE FEDERATION, NORTH CAROLINA WILDLIFE FEDERATION, SIERRA CLUB (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:01-cv-00274-JR, 1:01-cv-00320-JR(Fox, Howard) (Entered: 04/24/2007)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 4/20/2007, Entered: 4/20/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 76 MOTION to Enforce Motion for an Order to Clarify or Strike by UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS (Attachments: # 1)(Purdy, Angeline) (Entered: 04/20/2007)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 77 Filed: 4/5/2007, Entered: 4/5/2007 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER that a response to plaintiffs' motion for an order to clarify or strike 76 is due 21 days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge James Robertson on April 5, 2007. (MT) (Entered: 04/05/2007)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 4/2/2007, Entered: 4/2/2007 Motion to Enforce
                WITHDRAWN pursuant to Order filed 5/17/2007.....MOTION for an Order to Clarify or Strike by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS Associated Cases: 1:01-cv-00274-JR, 1:01-cv-00320-JR(Brown, Karma) Modified on 4/3/2007 (lc, ). (Entered: 04/02/2007)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 3/30/2007, Entered: 4/2/2007 Notice of Appeal
                  NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 70 Memorandum & Opinion, 71 Order, by NATIONAL WILDLIFE FEDERATION, NORTH CAROLINA WILDLIFE FEDERATION, SIERRA CLUB. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 4616003254. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (zlc, ) (Entered: 04/02/2007)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: 3/20/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response-ReplyCourt Filing
                    MINUTE ORDER granting defendants' unopposed motion for extension of time 73 to May 15, 2007. Signed by Judge James Robertson on March 20, 2007. (MT) (Entered: 03/20/2007)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/8/2007, Entered: 3/8/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to 72 Motion for Costs and Attorneys' Fees by UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:01-cv-00274-JR,1:01-cv-00320-JR(Purdy, Angeline) Modified on 3/9/2007 (zlc, ). (Entered: 03/08/2007)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 2/27/2007, Entered: 2/27/2007 Motion for Attorney Fees
                        WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO NOTICE FILED 6/21/2007..... MOTION for Attorney Fees and Memorandum in Support by NATIONAL STONE, SAND & GRAVEL ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN ROAD AND TRANSPORATION BUILDERS ASSOCIATION, NATIONWIDE PUBLIC PROJECTS COALITION. (Attachments: # 1 # 2 # 3 # 4 # 5 # 6)Associated Cases: 1:01-cv-00274-JR,1:01-cv-00320-JR(Petersen, Rafe) Modified on 6/22/2007 (nmw, ). (Entered: 02/27/2007)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank 71 Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: 1/30/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER granting plaintiff's motion for summary judgment 37 ; denying defendant's motion for summary judgment 39 and denying motion of intervenor defendants for summary judgment 40 . Signed by Judge James Robertson on January 30, 2007. (MT) (Entered: 01/30/2007)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: 1/30/2007 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                            MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge James Robertson on January 30, 2007. (MT) (Entered: 01/30/2007)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: 7/28/2006 Supplemental Memorandum
                              SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re 40 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by NATIONAL WILDLIFE FEDERATION, NORTH CAROLINA WILDLIFE FEDERATION, SIERRA CLUB. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)Associated Cases: 1:01-cv-00274-JR,1:01-cv-00320-JR(Fox, Howard) Modified on 7/31/2006 (lc, ). (Entered: 07/28/2006)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: 7/28/2006 Supplemental Memorandum
                                SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to Support Plaintiff National Association of Home Builders' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS. Associated Cases: 1:01-cv-00274-JR,1:01-cv-00320-JR(Brown, Karma) (Entered: 07/28/2006)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: 7/28/2006 Supplemental Memorandum
                                  SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re 39 Motion for Summary Judgment, 37 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 # 2 # 3)Associated Cases: 1:01-cv-00274-JR,1:01-cv-00320-JR(Purdy, Angeline) (Entered: 07/28/2006)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: 7/28/2006 Memorandum
                                    MEMORANDUM by NATIONAL STONE, SAND & GRAVEL ASSOCIAITON. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:01-cv-00274-JR,1:01-cv-00320-JR(Petersen, Rafe) (Entered: 07/28/2006)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: 7/7/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Memoranda by NATIONAL STONE, SAND & GRAVEL ASSOCIAITON. Associated Cases: 1:01-cv-00274-JR,1:01-cv-00320-JR(Liebesman, Lawrence) (Entered: 07/07/2006)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 6/9/2006, Entered: 6/9/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Briefs by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS, NATIONAL STONE, SAND & GRAVEL ASSOCIAITON, AMERICAN ROAD AND TRANSPORATION BUILDERS ASSOCIATION, NATIONWIDE PUBLIC PROJECTS COALITION. Associated Cases: 1:01-cv-00274-JR,1:01-cv-00320-JR(Brown, Karma) (Entered: 06/09/2006)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/1/2006, Entered: 5/1/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Memoranda by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS, NATIONAL STONE, SAND & GRAVEL ASSOCIAITON, AMERICAN ROAD AND TRANSPORATION BUILDERS ASSOCIATION, NATIONWIDE PUBLIC PROJECTS COALITION. Associated Cases: 1:01-cv-00274-JR,1:01-cv-00320-JR(Albrecht, Virginia) (Entered: 05/01/2006)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/24/2006, Entered: 4/24/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Karma B. Brown on behalf of NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS Associated Cases: 1:01-cv-00274-JR,1:01-cv-00320-JR(Brown, Karma) (Entered: 04/24/2006)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/5/2006, Entered: 4/20/2006 USCA Judgment
                                              USCA JUDGMENT (certified copy) as to 56 Notice of Appeal filed by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS; It is hereby ordered and adjudged that the judgment of the District Court appealed from in these causes is hereby reversed and the cases are remanded; USCA#04-5221 (jsc) (Entered: 04/20/2006)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/10/2006, Entered: 4/10/2006 Substitution of Counsel
                                                NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Angeline Purdy on behalf of UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY Substituting for attorney Scott Jordan Associated Cases: 1:01-cv-00274-JR,1:01-cv-00320-JR(Purdy, Angeline) (Entered: 04/10/2006)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/7/2006, Entered: 4/7/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  NOTICE re mandate of the Court of Appeals. Signed by Judge James Robertson on April 7, 2006. (MT) (Entered: 04/07/2006)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/10/2004, Entered: 6/15/2004 Notice of Appeal
                                                    NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 55 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Leave to File by NATIONAL WILDLIFE FEDERATION, NORTH CAROLINA WILDLIFE FEDERATION, SIERRA CLUB. Filing fee $ 255, receipt number 124916. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(bcs, ) (Entered: 06/15/2004)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/27/2004, Entered: 6/3/2004 Notice of Appeal
                                                      NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 54 Memorandum & Opinion, 55 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Order on Motion for Leave to File, by AMERICAN ROAD AND TRANSPORATION BUILDERS ASSOCIATION, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS, NATIONAL STONE, SAND & GRAVEL ASSOCIAITON, NATIONWIDE PUBLIC PROJECTS COALITION. Filing fee $ 255, receipt number 124538. (rje, ) (Entered: 06/03/2004)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: 6/3/2004 Notice of Appeal
                                                        NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 54 Memorandum & Opinion, 55 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Leave to File, by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS. Filing fee $ 255, receipt number 124638. (rje, ) (Entered: 06/03/2004)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/31/2004, Entered: 3/31/2004 Order on Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER denying plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment 37 , denying intervenor defendants' motion to amend the administrative record 38 , treating defendants' motion for summary judgment 39 as a motion to dismiss and granting, and denying as moot intervenor defendants' motion for summary judgment 40 . Signed by Judge James Robertson on March 31, 2004. (MT) (Entered: 03/31/2004)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/31/2004, Entered: 3/31/2004 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                                            MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge James Robertson on March 31, 2004. (MT) (Entered: 03/31/2004)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/25/2004, Entered: 3/25/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                              NOTICE by NATIONAL STONE, SAND & GRAVEL ASSOCIAITON (Joint) of Recent Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)Associated Cases: 1:01-cv-00274-JR,1:01-cv-00320-JR(Petersen, Rafe) (Entered: 03/25/2004)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/19/2004, Entered: 3/19/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                NOTICE by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS of Withdrawal of Appearance of Andrew J. Turner Associated Cases: 1:01-cv-00274-JR,1:01-cv-00320-JR(Albrecht, Virginia) (Entered: 03/19/2004)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/31/2003, Entered: 8/1/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                  NOTICE (JOINT) by plaintiffs NATL ASSN HOME BLDRS in 1:01-cv-00274, NATL STONE SAND/GRAV in 1:01-cv-00320, AMERICAN ROAD of recent developments (bcs) (Entered: 08/01/2003)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/10/2003, Entered: 7/14/2003 Supplemental Memorandum
                                                                    REPLY by intervenor-defendants in 1:01-cv-00274 in support of cross motion for summary judgment [40-1] by SIERRA CLUB, NC WILDLIFE FED., NATL WILDLIFE FED (rje) (Entered: 07/14/2003)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/24/2003, Entered: 6/25/2003 Supplemental Memorandum
                                                                      REPLY by federal defendant US ARMY CORPS/ENG. in 1:01-cv-00274 in further support of cross motion for summary judgment [39-1] by federal defendants (rje) (Entered: 06/25/2003)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/11/2003, Entered: 6/12/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                        NOTICE by plaintiff NATL ASSN HOME BLDRS in 1:01-cv-00274 of recent developments; attachments (3) (bm) (Entered: 06/12/2003)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/23/2003, Entered: 6/3/2003 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                          RESPONSE by plaintiff NATL ASSN HOME BLDRS in 1:01-cv-00274 in opposition to cross motion for summary judgment [40-1] by SIERRA CLUB, NC WILDLIFE FED., NATL WILDLIFE FED, cross motion for summary judgment [39-1] by federal defendants. (nmr) (Entered: 06/03/2003)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/23/2003, Entered: 6/3/2003 Supplemental Memorandum
                                                                            REPLY by plaintiff NATL ASSN HOME BLDRS in 1:01-cv-00274 in support of motion for summary judgment [37-1] by NATL ASSN HOME BLDRS (nmr) (Entered: 06/03/2003)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/23/2003, Entered: 6/3/2003 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                              RESPONSE by plaintiffs in 1:01-cv-00320 in opposition to cross motion for summary judgment [40-1] by SIERRA CLUB, NC WILDLIFE FED., NATL WILDLIFE FED in 1:01-cv-00274, cross motion for summary judgment [39-1] by federal defendants in 1:01-cv-00274. (nmr) (Entered: 06/03/2003)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/23/2003, Entered: 6/3/2003 Supplemental Memorandum
                                                                                REPLY by plaintiffs in 1:01-cv-00320 in support of motion for summary judgment [37-1] by plaintiffs in 1:01-cv-00274 (nmr) (Entered: 06/03/2003)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/23/2003, Entered: 6/3/2003 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                  MOTION filed for PACIFIC LEGAL FOUND. to case(s) 1:01-cv-00274, to file amicus brief ; EXHIBIT (AMICUS BRIEF) (nmr) (Entered: 06/03/2003)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/27/2003, Entered: 5/27/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER by Judge James Robertson: that Pacific Legal Foundation's motion to file an Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiffs is Granted; that the Pacific Legal Foundation's Amicus Curiae Brief is hereby filed. (N) (dam) (Entered: 05/27/2003)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/22/2003, Entered: 5/22/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                      THIRD AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge James Robertson: Plaintiff's motions for summary judgment, and Plaintiffs and Defendant-Intervenors motions to supplement the record and/or seek discovery is due by 3/3/03; Defendants responses to Plaintiffs' motions for summary judgment or other motions by plaintiffs, and any cross-motions due by 4/11/03; Defendant-Intervenors responses to plaintiffs motions for summary judgment or other motions by plaintiffs, and any cross-motions, due by 5/1/03; plaintiff's reply to their motions for summary judgment and their response to any cross-motions due by 5/23/03; defendants reply to plaintiffs' responses due by 6/24/03; defendant-intervenors reply to plaintiffs' responses due by 7/10/03; oral argument, if any, shall proceed at a date and time to be scheduled by the Court. (N) (dam) (Entered: 05/22/2003)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/1/2003, Entered: 5/2/2003 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                        CROSS MOTIONS by intervenor-defendants NATL WILDLIFE FED, NC WILDLIFE FED., SIERRA CLUB in 1:01-cv-00274 for summary judgment ; exhibits (2) (bcs) (Entered: 05/02/2003)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/11/2003, Entered: 4/14/2003 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                          CROSS MOTIONS by federal defendants US ARMY CORPS/ENG., JOSEPH WESTPHAL, ROBERT B. FLOWERS, EPA, CHRISTINE TODD WHITMAN in 1:01-cv-00274, US ARMY CORPS/ENG., GREGORY P. DAHLBERG, ROBERT B. FLOWERS, EPA, CHRISTINE TODD WHITMAN in 1:01-cv-00320 for summary judgment ; exhibit (1) (bcs) (Entered: 04/14/2003)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/3/2003, Entered: 3/5/2003 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                            MOTION filed by intervenor-defendants NATL WILDLIFE FED, NC WILDLIFE FED., SIERRA CLUB in 1:01-cv-00274 for leave to file a supplement to the Administrative Record ; EXHIBIT (SUPPLEMENT) (ks) (Entered: 03/05/2003)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/3/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                              MOTION filed by plaintiff NATL ASSN HOME BLDRS in 1:01-cv-00274 for summary judgment ; Exhibits (17) (Bulky) (ks) (Entered: 03/04/2003)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/22/2003, Entered: 1/23/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER by Judge James Robertson: Plaintiffs motion for summary judgment and plaintiffs and intervenor-defendants shall file any motion to supplement the record and/or seek discovery by 2/24/03; defendants response to motion for summary judgment or other motions by plaintiffs, and any cross motions, by 4/9/03; the page length of defendnats'combined brief in support of its cross motion and in response to plaintiffs' motions shall not exceed the combined number of pages in plaintiffs briefs in support of their motions; defendant-intervenors shall file their responses to plaintiffs' motions for summary judgment or other motions by plaintiffs, and any cross motions, by 4/28/03; plaintiffs shall file their reply in support of their motion for summary judgment, and their reponse to any cross-motions by defendants and defendant-intervenors by 5/14/03; defendants shall file their reply to plaintiffs' responses by 6/13/03; defendant-intervenors shall file their reply to plaintiffs' responses by 6/27/03; oral argument if any shall proceed at a date and time to be scheduled by the Court. 5/14/03 ; (N) (dam) (Entered: 01/23/2003)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/13/2003, Entered: 1/14/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge James Robertson: plaintiffs and intervenor defendants motions for summary judgment due 2/24/03; defendants response to motion for summary judgment or any cross motions due 4/9/03; defendant-intervenors shall file their responses to plaintiffs' motions for summary judgment or other motions by plaintiffs, and any cross motions due 4/28/03; plaintiffs shall file their reply in support of their motions for summary judgment, and their response to any cross-motions by defendants and defendant-intervenors by 5/14/03; defendants shall file their reply to plaintiffs' responses by 6/4/03; defendant-intervenors shall file their reply to plaintiffs' responses by 6/27/03; oral argument, if any, shall proceed at a date and time to be scheduled by the Court. (N) (dam) (Entered: 01/14/2003)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: 1/10/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING by plaintiff NATL ASSN HOME BLDRS in 1:01-cv-00274, federal defendants US ARMY CORPS/ENG. , JOSEPH WESTPHAL , ROBERT B. FLOWERS , EPA, CHRISTINE TODD WHITMAN in 1:01-cv-00274 proposed case management order (bcs) (Entered: 01/10/2003)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/20/2002, Entered: 12/23/2002 Status Report
                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT by plaintiffs NATL ASSN HOME BLDRS, NATL STONE SAND/GRAV, AMERICAN ROAD in 1:01-cv-00320 pursuant to this court's 7/5/02 order staying proceedings pending decision by the U.S. Supreme Court. (bcs) Modified on 12/23/2002 (Entered: 12/23/2002)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/5/2002, Entered: 7/5/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge James Robertson: granting motion to stay the proceedings until US Supreme Courts decision on pending petition [31-1] by AMERICAN ROAD, NATL STONE SAND/GRAV, NATL ASSN HOME BLDRS in 1:01-cv-00274, 1:01-cv-00320 Status Report due: 3/1/03 in 1:01-cv-00274, in 1:01-cv-00320 (N) (dam) (Entered: 07/05/2002)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/25/2002, Entered: 6/26/2002, Terminated: 7/5/2002 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                          MOTION (UNOPPOSED) filed by plaintiffs NATL ASSN HOME BLDRS in 1:01-cv-00274, NATL STONE SAND/GRAV ,AMERICAN ROAD in 1:01-cv-00320 to stay the proceedings until US Supreme Courts decision on pending petition (bcs) (Entered: 06/26/2002)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/21/2002, Entered: 6/24/2002 Transcript
                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT filed for date(s) of 4/23/02. Reporter: Jacqueline L. Wood, Miller Reporting Company (bcs) (Entered: 06/24/2002)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/31/2002, Entered: 6/3/2002
                                                                                                              ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by federal defendants US ARMY CORPS/ENG., JOSEPH WESTPHAL, ROBERT B. FLOWERS, EPA, CHRISTINE TODD WHITMAN (bcs) (Entered: 06/03/2002)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/8/2002, Entered: 5/10/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                CONSENT CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge James Robertson: defts. to file certified index to the administrative record by 5/31/02; pltfs.' motions for summary judgment and pltfs.' and intervenor defts.' motion to supplement the administrative record and/or seek discovery due 7/16/02; defts.'s response to motion for summary judgment and other motions by pltfs. and any cross motions due 9/6/02; deft. intervenors shall file their responses to pltfs.' motions for summary judgment or other motions by pltfs. and any cross motions by 9/20/02; pltfs.'s reply to defts.' and deft. intervenors' motions and reponses due by 10/11/02 ; defts. to file their reply to pltfs.' responses by 11/12/02; deft. intervenos shall file their reply to pltfs.' responses by 11/27/02; oral argument shall proceed at a date and time to be scheduled by the Court. (N) (mlp) (Entered: 05/10/2002)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: 5/9/2002 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                  ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for plaintiff NATL ASSN HOME BLDRS in 1:01-cv-00274 by Andrew Jacob Turner (nmr) (Entered: 05/09/2002)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: 4/23/2002 Status Report
                                                                                                                    JOINT STATUS REPORT by federal defendant US ARMY CORPS/ENG. in 1:01-cv-00274, federal defendant JOSEPH WESTPHAL in 1:01-cv-00274, federal defendant ROBERT B. FLOWERS in 1:01-cv-00274, federal defendant EPA in 1:01-cv-00274, federal defendant CHRISTINE TODD WHITMAN in 1:01-cv-00274, federal defendant US ARMY CORPS/ENG. in 1:01-cv-00320, federal defendant ROBERT B. FLOWERS in 1:01-cv-00320, federal defendant EPA in 1:01-cv-00320, federal defendant CHRISTINE TODD WHITMAN in 1:01-cv-00320 (aet) (Entered: 04/23/2002)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/17/2002, Entered: 4/19/2002 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                      MOTION filed by plaintiff NATL ASSN HOME BLDRS in 1:01-cv-00274 for leave to file to file a second amended complaint ; EXHIBIT-SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (bm) (Entered: 04/19/2002)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/12/2002, Entered: 4/15/2002 Status Report
                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT - APRIL 2002 by federal defendants US ARMY CORPS/ENG. JOSEPH WESTPHAL, ROBERT B. FLOWERS, EPA, CHRISTINE TODD WHITMAN in 1:01-cv-00274 (bm) (Entered: 04/15/2002)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/12/2002, Entered: 3/18/2002 Status Report
                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT by federal defendant US ARMY CORPS/ENG. in 1:01-cv-00274, federal defendant JOSEPH WESTPHAL in 1:01-cv-00274, federal defendant ROBERT B. FLOWERS in 1:01-cv-00274, federal defendant EPA in 1:01-cv-00274, federal defendant CHRISTINE TODD WHITMAN in 1:01-cv-00274, federal defendant US ARMY CORPS/ENG. in 1:01-cv-00320, federal defendant GREGORY P. DAHLBERG in 1:01-cv-00320, federal defendant ROBERT B. FLOWERS in 1:01-cv-00320, federal defendant EPA in 1:01-cv-00320, federal defendant CHRISTINE TODD WHITMAN in 1:01-cv-00320 (aet) (Entered: 03/18/2002)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/15/2002, Entered: 3/15/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge James Robertson: granting motion for NATL WILDLIFE FED, NC WILDLIFE FED., SIERRA CLUB to intervene as defendants [7-1]; unless this case has been settled by the 4/12/02 deadline imposed by the govt.'s own status report, status hearing is set for 4:30 4/23/02. (N) (mlp) (Entered: 03/15/2002)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/20/2002, Entered: 2/26/2002 Status Report
                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT - February 2002 by federal defendants US ARMY CORPS/ENG. , JOSEPH WESTPHAL , ROBERT B. FLOWERS , , CHRISTINE TODD WHITMAN in 1:01-cv-00274 (cjp) (Entered: 02/26/2002)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/31/2002, Entered: 2/5/2002 Status Report
                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT by defendants US ARMY CORPS/ENG. ,JOSEPH WESTPHAL, ROBERT B. FLOWERS, EPA, CHRISTINE TODD WHITMAN; and request for case to remain stayed. (ks) (Entered: 02/05/2002)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/20/2001, Entered: 12/21/2001 Status Report
                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT by federal defendant US ARMY CORPS/ENG. in 1:01-cv-00274, federal defendant JOSEPH WESTPHAL in 1:01-cv-00274, federal defendant ROBERT B. FLOWERS in 1:01-cv-00274, federal defendant EPA in 1:01-cv-00274, federal defendant CHRISTINE TODD WHITMAN in 1:01-cv-00274 -December 2001 (cjp) (Entered: 12/21/2001)
                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/31/2001, Entered: 11/2/2001 Status Report
                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT by federal defendant US ARMY CORPS/ENG. in 1:01-cv-00274, federal defendant JOSEPH WESTPHAL in 1:01-cv-00274, federal defendant ROBERT B. FLOWERS in 1:01-cv-00274, federal defendant EPA in 1:01-cv-00274, federal defendant CHRISTINE TODD WHITMAN in 1:01-cv-00274 for October 2001 (cjp) (Entered: 11/02/2001)
                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/31/2001, Entered: 9/4/2001 Status Report
                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT (8/2001) by federal defendants US ARMY CORPS/ENG., JOSEPH WESTPHAL , ROBERT B. FLOWERS , EPA, CHRISTINE TODD WHITMAN in 1:01-cv-00274 (cjp) (Entered: 09/04/2001)
                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/27/2001, Entered: 7/31/2001 Status Report
                                                                                                                                        UNITED STATES STATUS REPORT -July 2001 by federal defendant US ARMY CORPS/ENG. in 1:01-cv-00274, federal defendant JOSEPH WESTPHAL in 1:01-cv-00274, federal defendant ROBERT B. FLOWERS in 1:01-cv-00274, federal defendant EPA in 1:01-cv-00274, federal defendant CHRISTINE TODD WHITMAN in 1:01-cv-00274, federal defendant US ARMY CORPS/ENG. in 1:01-cv-00320, federal defendant GREGORY P. DAHLBERG in 1:01-cv-00320, federal defendant ROBERT B. FLOWERS in 1:01-cv-00320, federal defendant EPA in 1:01-cv-00320, federal defendant CHRISTINE TODD WHITMAN in 1:01-cv-00320 (cas) (Entered: 07/31/2001)
                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/29/2001, Entered: 7/11/2001 Status Report
                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT by federal defendant in 1:01-cv-00274 June 2001. (td) (Entered: 07/11/2001)
                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/25/2001, Entered: 6/18/2001 Status Report
                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT by federal defendants. (ks) (Entered: 06/18/2001)
                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/25/2001, Entered: 6/18/2001 Motion to Consolidate Cases
                                                                                                                                              MOTION filed by federal defendants to consolidate cases with CA 01-320 (ks) (Entered: 06/18/2001)
                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/31/2001, Entered: 6/12/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge James Robertson: granting consent motion of U.S. to consolidate cases CA 01-0274-JR and CA 01-0320-JR; the cases will be captioned under the latter named case; CA 01-0320-JR is dismissed. (N) (mlp) (Entered: 06/12/2001)
                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/1/2001, Entered: 6/8/2001 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by intervenor-defendant NATL WILDLIFE FED, intervenor-defendant NC WILDLIFE FED., intervenor-defendant SIERRA CLUB to response in opposition to motion for NATL WILDLIFE FED, NC WILDLIFE FED., SIERRA CLUB to intervene as defendants [7-1]; exhibits (2) (tb) (Entered: 06/08/2001)
                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/1/2001, Entered: 6/8/2001 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION (UNOPPOSED) filed by intervenor-defendant NATL WILDLIFE FED, intervenor-defendant NC WILDLIFE FED., intervenor-defendant SIERRA CLUB for leave to file original signature pages of declarations ; exhibits (2) (tb) (Entered: 06/08/2001)
                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/6/2001, Entered: 6/6/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge James Robertson: granting unopposed motion of movants National Wildlife Federation, et al. to file the original signature pages of the declarations of Charles W. Rice; Clerk is directed to file the lodged originals. (N) (mlp) (Entered: 06/06/2001)
                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/21/2001, Entered: 5/22/2001 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by plaintiff NATL ASSN HOME BLDRS in opposition to motion for NATL WILDLIFE FED, NC WILDLIFE FED., SIERRA CLUB to intervene as defendants [7-1]; exhibits (3) . (jf) (Entered: 05/22/2001)
                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/7/2001, Entered: 5/8/2001, Terminated: 3/15/2002 Motion to Intervene
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION filed for NATL WILDLIFE FED, NC WILDLIFE FED., SIERRA CLUB to intervene as defendants ; Exhibits (15); EXHIBIT (ANSWER) (tth) Modified on 05/08/2001 (Entered: 05/08/2001)
                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/10/2001, Entered: 4/11/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge James Robertson: granting motion to extend time to 4/23/01 to answer complaint [1-1] [5-1] by federal defendants. (N) (mlp) (Entered: 04/11/2001)
                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/3/2001, Entered: 4/5/2001 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION filed by federal defendant US ARMY CORPS/ENG., federal defendant JOSEPH WESTPHAL, federal defendant ROBERT B. FLOWERS, federal defendant EPA, federal defendant CHRISTINE TODD WHITMAN to extend time to 4/23/01 to answer complaint [1-1] (cas) (Entered: 04/05/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/28/2001, Entered: 3/1/2001 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney for DC
                                                                                                                                                                RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of summons and complaint executed upon U.S. Attorney on 2/6/01 ; attachments (bjsp) (Entered: 03/01/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/6/2001, Entered: 2/8/2001 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                  LCvR 26.1 Certificate of disclosure of corporate affiliations and financial interests by plaintiff NATIONAL ASSOC. (bm) (Entered: 02/08/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/6/2001, Entered: 2/8/2001 Notice of Related Case
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTIFICATION OF RELATED CASE: Case related to Case No(s): CA 93-1754 (bm) (Entered: 02/08/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/6/2001, Entered: 2/8/2001, Terminated: 4/10/2001 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT filed by plaintiff NATIONAL ASSOC. (bm) (Entered: 02/08/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 177 times.

                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?