AL-BALUCHI v. GATES et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-02083
District Judge Paul L. Friedman, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 13, 2020 at 2:36 PM ST (1.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo AMMAR AL-BALUCHI, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/15/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY James C. Neville +1 516 883 5905 +1 516 883 4954 jcneville@optonline.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Defender Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Lee Kaplan +1 602 382 2767 +1 602 382 2700 dan_kaplan@fd.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jon M Sands +1 602 382 2700 +1 602 382 2800 jon_sands@fd.org

Toggle Switch Represented by R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Clive A. Stafford Smith +01144 207 353 4640 +01144 207 353 4641 clivess@mac.com
v.
No Logo COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, Respondent

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, Respondent

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Gates, Robert M. Gates, Robert M., Respondent
Officially listed as "ROBERT M. GATES"
Nacco Industries, Inc. Unknown Role, Nacco Industries, Inc.
Starbucks Corporation Unknown Role, Starbucks Corporation

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2241
Nature of Suit 530 - Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
  Entries (179) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 2/13/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 9/17/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 9/16/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 7/29/2019, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 7/29/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Hold in Abeyance
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 7/1/2019, Entered: None NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 3/26/2019, Entered: None Transcript
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 2/25/2019, Entered: None NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Continue
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: None Continue
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document 207 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Modify
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Modify
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Hold in Abeyance
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Memorandum
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Reconsideration
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 6/28/2017, Entered: None Status Report
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Status Report
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Status Report
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 3/18/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None Response to (non-motion) Document
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: None Briefing Schedule
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 1/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM by AMMAR AL-BALUCHI. (Kaplan, Daniel) (Entered: 01/24/2012)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 120 Filed: 1/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM by AMMAR AL-BALUCHI. (Wilkinson, Karen) (Entered: 01/24/2012)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 1/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM by AMMAR AL-BALUCHI. (Sands, Jon) (Entered: 01/24/2012)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel L. Kaplan on behalf of AMMAR AL-BALUCHI (Kaplan, Daniel) (Entered: 10/31/2011)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Karen M. Wilkinson on behalf of AMMAR AL-BALUCHI (Wilkinson, Karen) (Entered: 10/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Jon M. Sands on behalf of AMMAR AL-BALUCHI (Sands, Jon) (Entered: 10/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  ORDER that the Office of the Federal Public Defender for the District of Arizona is appointed to represent the petitioner. Signed by Unassigned on October 11, 2011. (MA) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 6/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing by COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, ROBERT M. GATES (Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 06/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER that the matter that is the subject of the government's classified filing of March 24, 2011 [Docket #112] is hereby transferred by consent to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on April 18, 2011.(MA) (Entered: 04/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 3/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing by COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, ROBERT M. GATES (Wolfe, Kristina). This entry has been transferred by consent to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 4/19/2011. (zmm) (Entered: 03/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE Of Entry Of Protective Order Governing Military Commission Proceedings by BARACK H. OBAMA, ROBERT M. GATES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Military Commission Protective Order)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance and Memorandum of Understanding by Clive A. Stafford Smith on behalf of AMMAR AL-BALUCHI. (jf, ) (Entered: 10/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT : Joint Pre-Hearing Statement by BARACK OBAMA. (Marcus, Lisa) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting respondents' motion to amend and for clarification of the 1/14/10 order. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 7/27/10 nunc pro tunc to 7/23/10. This order originally was filed in 08-mc-442 but also should have been docketed in all cases captioned herein. (Entered: 09/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Compliance by BARACK OBAMA (Marcus, Lisa) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Amended MOTION for Extension of Time Regarding Propsed Public Returns by BARACK H. OBAMA (Attachments: # 1 Revised Proposed Order)(Marcus, Lisa) (Entered: 07/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing of Reply Brief in Further Support of Respondents Motion to Amend and for Clarification of the Courts January 14, 2010 Order Regarding Public Returns (Marcus, Lisa) (Entered: 07/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (Respondents Consent Motion for a Five Page Enlargement of the Page Limitation for Their Reply Brief) by BARACK OBAMA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marcus, Lisa) (Entered: 07/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by BARACK H. OBAMA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marcus, Lisa) (Entered: 06/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION to File a Consolidated Reply and for an Extension of Time to Reply to the Responses of Petitioners and Press Intervenors by BARACK H. OBAMA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marcus, Lisa) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Continue Deadline of Filing Consolidated Response to Respondents Motion to Amend and for Clarification of the Courts January 14, 2010 Order Regarding Public Returns by SAMI AL HAJJ, KHAIRULLA KHAIRKHWA, SAMI AL HAJJ, MULLAH NORULLAH NOORI, ABDUL AL RAZZAQ MUHAMMAD SALIH, MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK, SALIM JUMA KHAMISI, ZAYN AL ABIDIN MUHAMMAD HUSAYN, MOHAMMED SULAYMON BARRE, AWAL GUL, SHAWKI AWAD BALZUHAIR, SHAWALI KHAN, AMMAR AL-BALUCHI, HAMOUD ABDULLAH HAMOUD HASSAN AL WADY, ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI, YAKUBI, KAHLID SAAD MOHAMMED, MONSOOR MUHAMMED ALI QATTAA, ABDULAH ALHAMIRI, SAMI AL HAJJ, OBAYDULLAH, MAHMMOUD OMAR MOHAMMED BIN ATEF, MUHAMMAD AHMAD ABDALLAH AL ANSI, SAMI AL HAJJ, ABDUL RAHIM HUSSEIN MUHAMMED ALI NASHIR, SCOTT L. FENSTERMAKER, SAAD MASIR MUKBL AL AZANI, ABDUL RAHMAN UMIR AL QYATI, SALEM AHMED HADI, ABDUL GHAFFAR, ADEL NOORI, MUIEEN ADEEN JAMAL ADEEN ABD AL F. ABD AL SATTAR, AHMED YASLAM SAID KUMAN, SAMI AL HAJJ, SHARIFULLAH, SUBHANULLAH, FNU HAFIZULLAH (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Proposed Order)(Thompson, Darin) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE Of Filing -- Respondents Motion To Amend And For Clarification Of The Courts January 14, 2010 Order Regarding Public Returns by BARACK OBAMA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 04/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION Regarding Bagram Theater Internment Facility by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER. (Lin, Jean) (Entered: 03/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 3/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER OF 3/16/10.....NOTICE informing the Court and government counsel of counsel's unavailability for the scheduled Monday, March 15, 2010 status conference by AMMAR AL-BALUCHI (Fenstermaker, Scott) Modified on 3/17/2010 (td, ). (Entered: 03/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT on Discovery and Request for a Status Conference by COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, ROBERT M. GATES. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 02/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 1/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Public Filing of Factual Return by COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, ROBERT M. GATES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Narrative, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit 24, # 26 Exhibit 25, # 27 Exhibit 26, # 28 Exhibit 27, # 29 Exhibit 28, # 30 Exhibit 29, # 31 Exhibit 30, # 32 Exhibit 31, # 33 Exhibit 32, # 34 Exhibit 33, # 35 Exhibit 34)(Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 01/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 12/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE to the Court by BARACK OBAMA, ROBERT GATES (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Major General Curtis M. Scaparrotti)(Lin, Jean) (Entered: 12/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 12/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to submit a status report; (See Docket Entry No. 93 to view document) by COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, ROBERT M. GATES (td, ) (Entered: 12/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 12/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION Leave to Modify Discovery Schedule and to Submit a Status Report by COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, ROBERT M. GATES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 12/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 12/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM by COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, ROBERT M. GATES. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 12/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 12/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing of Factual Return by COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, ROBERT M. GATES (Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 12/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 10/28/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 89 Government's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Factual Return. Ordered that the government shall file the factual return for Petitioner on or before 12/17/2009. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/28/2009. (mm) (Entered: 10/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Factual Return by ROBERT M. GATES, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 10/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 10/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to opposition to motion re 83 First MOTION Order Directing Respondents to Timely Provide Legal Mail to Petitioner Ammar al-Baluchi filed by AMMAR AL-BALUCHI. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration in support of Petitioner's Reply to Respondents' Response)(Fenstermaker, Scott) (Entered: 10/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum in opposition to re 83 First MOTION Order Directing Respondents to Timely Provide Legal Mail to Petitioner Ammar al-Baluchi filed by ROBERT M. GATES, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 10/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 85 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. Ordered that the government shall file its response to attorney Scott L. Fenstermaker's Motion 83 for Miscellaneous Relief on or before 10/5/2009. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/1/2009. (mm) (Entered: 10/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 9/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by ROBERT M. GATES, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 09/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 9/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT Declaration of Scott L. Fenstermaker attesting to service of motion papers on the Department of Justice's Special Litigation Team by AMMAR AL-BALUCHI. (Fenstermaker, Scott) (Entered: 09/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 9/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  First MOTION Order Directing Respondents to Timely Provide Legal Mail to Petitioner Ammar al-Baluchi by AMMAR AL-BALUCHI (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration in Support of Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 3 Affidavit Rule 7(m) Certification)(Fenstermaker, Scott) (Entered: 09/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 8/28/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDERED that the 81 Government's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Factual Return is GRANTED. Ordered that the Government shall file the factual return for Petitioner Ammar Al-Baluchi, a/k/a Ali Abdul Aziz Ali(ISN 10018) on or before November 2, 2009. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 8/27/09. (mpt, ) (Entered: 08/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 8/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Factual Return by ROBERT M. GATES, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 08/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 8/20/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Paul L. Friedman held on 6/26/09; Page Numbers: 1-19. Date of Issuance:8/20/09. Court Reporter/Transcriber Linda L. Russo, Telephone number 202 354-3244, Court Reporter Email Address : lindalrusso@gmail.com.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/10/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/21/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/18/2009.(Russo, Linda) (Entered: 08/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT - Joint Status Report by ROBERT M. GATES, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO. (Elliott, Stephen) (Entered: 07/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 7/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Acknowledgement of Representation by AMMAR AL-BALUCHI (Fenstermaker, Scott) (Entered: 07/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 7/16/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER amending the definitions and procedures set forth in the Case Management Order issued by Judge Hogan in In re Guantanamo Bay Detainee Litig., Misc. No. 08-0442, Dkt. No. 940 (Nov. 6, 2008), amended by Misc. No. 08-0442, Docket No. 1315 (Dec. 16, 2008), for the above captioned cases. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on July 16, 2009. (MA) (Entered: 07/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 76 Filed: 7/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT re 68 filed by ROBERT M. GATES, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO.(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd, ) (Entered: 07/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 7/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE - Supplemental Notice of Filing of Ex Parte Submission Under Seal by ROBERT M. GATES, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO (Elliott, Stephen) (Entered: 07/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 7/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Task Force Recommendation by ROBERT M. GATES, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO (Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 07/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 7/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing of Ex Parte Submission Under Seal by ROBERT M. GATES, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO (Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 07/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 7/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting in part and denying in part government's Motion to Amend the September 11, 2008 Protective Order and Counsel Access Procedures and the January 9, 2009 Amended TS/SCI Protective Order and Counsel Access Procedures. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 7/10/09. (lctfh1) (Entered: 07/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 7/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 7/10/09. (lctfh1) (Entered: 07/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 7/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM by AMMAR AL-BALUCHI. (Fenstermaker, Scott) (Entered: 07/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 7/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying as moot 63 petitioner's motion for hearing. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on July 2, 2009. (MA) (Entered: 07/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER that on or before July 10, 2009, for each of the above-captioned cases, respondents shall file with the Court ex parte and under seal a report detailing the current status of the Guantanamo Review Task Force review process with respect to petitioner, and that respondents shall be under an affirmative and ongoing obligation to immediately notify the court of any changes to petitioner's status. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on July 2, 2009. (MA) (Entered: 07/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by James C. Neville on behalf of AMMAR AL-BALUCHI (rdj) (Entered: 06/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT Declaration of Service of Letter, Court Order, and May 26, 2008 letter from Petitioner to Scott L. Fenstermaker, Esq. by AMMAR AL-BALUCHI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit to Declaration of Service on Respondents)(Fenstermaker, Scott) (Entered: 06/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/18/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER that Mr. Fenstermaker shall promptly produce Exhibit A to the respondents and that respondents shall immediately review the exhibit to determine whether it, along with Mr. Fenstermake's other filings, constitute authorization for Mr. Fenstermaker to represent the petitioner in these proceedings. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on June 18, 2009. (MA) (Entered: 06/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 6/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re 62 Order on Motion for Leave to File filed by AMMAR AL-BALUCHI. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Scott L. Fenstermaker, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service)(td, ) (Entered: 06/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ENTERED IN ERROR.....First MOTION for Hearing at which Petitioner can testify regarding the authorization of Scott L. Fenstermaker, Esq. to file the instant petition by AMMAR AL-BALUCHI (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration in support of motion for a hearing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 3 Declaration Declaration of Service)(Fenstermaker, Scott) Modified on 6/17/2009 (td, ). (Entered: 06/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 27 petitioner's motion for leave to file a letter from the petitioneor under seal for the Court's in camera and ex parte consideration. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on June 10, 2009. (MA) (Entered: 06/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying without prejudice government's Motion for Reconsideration of Orders Regarding Discovery from the Guantanamo Review Task Force. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 6/10/09. (lctfh1) (Entered: 06/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to opposition to motion re (105 in 1:08-cv-01238-RWR) MOTION for Reconsideration, (106 in 1:08-cv-01238-RWR) MOTION for Order Regarding Discovery From The Guantanamo Review Task Force filed by BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BARACK OBAMA, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES. (Henry, Terry) (Entered: 06/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen McCoy Elliott on behalf of ROBERT M. GATES, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO (Elliott, Stephen) (Entered: 06/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying without prejudice government's Motion to Confirm Designation of Unclassified Factual Returns as "Protected." Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 6/1/09. (lctfh1) (Entered: 06/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 6/1/09. (lctfh1) (Entered: 06/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Strike , and in Opposition to, Respondents' Motion for Reconsideration of Orders Regarding Discovery from the Guantanamo Review Task Force by OMAR KHADR, FATMAH ELSAMNAH, FALEN GHEREBI, BISHER NASER ALI ALMARWALH, HUISSEN NASER ALI ALMARWALH, MASAAB OMAR AL-MADHWANI, ALI OMAR MADHWANI, ABDULKHALIQ AL-BAIDHANI, KHALID AL-BAIDHANI, ALI AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, ABDULLAH AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, SUHAIL ABDU ANAM, SAEED AHMED AL-SARIM, SAMIR AHMED AL-SARIM, IMAD ABDULLAH HASSAN, AMRO ABDULLAH HASSAN, JALAL SALIM BIN AMER, FAEZ BIN AMER, ALI YAHYA MAHDI, MOHAMED YAHYA MAHDI, ATAG ALI ABDOH, MOHAMED ABDU ANAM, KHALID AHMED KASSIM, FADHLE AHMED KASSIM, FAHMI ABDULLAH AHMED, KMAL ABDULLAH AHMED, ABDUALAZIZ ABDOH AL SWIDI, ADNAN ABDOH ALSWIDI, AL HUSSIN AL-TIS, HADI HUSSIN AL-TIS, FAHMI ABDULLAH UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, ALL PETITIONERS, ABDULLAH AHMED UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, MAHMOUD AHMED, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, FOADE YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, AREF ABD IL RHEEM, AREF ABD AL RAHIM, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, MAHMOAD ABDAH, MOHAMED FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, JAMAL MAR'I, NABIL MOHAMED MAR'I, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ADIL EL HAJ OBAID, NAZEM SAEED EL HAJ OBAID, MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, BASHIR MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, SADEQ MOHAMMED SAID, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, ABD ALSALAM MOHAMMED SAEED, FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF, SHEAB AL MOHAMEDI, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA, ALI SALAH KAHLAH AL-MARRI, JARALLAH AL-MARRI, AHCENE ZEMIRI, KARINA DERESHTEANU, RAMI BIN SAAD AL-OTEIBI, HANI SALEH RASHID ABDULLAH, YOSRA SALEH RASHID ABDULLAH, MAHMOOD SALIM AL MOHAMMED, ABDULLA SALIM AL-MOHAMMED, FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, OMAR DEGHAYES, SHERIF EL-MASHAD, WAFFA EL-ARABIE, ADEL FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, EAHME SALEM ALASSANI, SALEM SAED ALASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHY, ZAHER OMER BEN HAMDON, MOHAMMED OMER KHAMIS HAMDON, MOHAMMED AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MUHAMMAD AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MOHAMED ALI ABDULLA, MUHAMMAD ALI ABDULLAH BAWAZIR, SALIH ALI ABDULLAH BAWAZIR, FAHMI SALEM AL-ASSANI, SALEM SAID AL-ASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, ZAHIR OMAR KHAMIS BIN HAMDOON, MUHAMMAD OMAR KHAMIS BIN HAMDOON, SALEH ALI ABDULLA BAWAZER, AHMED ABDULLAH AL-WAZAN, YOUNOUS CHEKKOURI, DJAMEL AMEZIANE, AHAMED ABDUL AZIZ, SABIHA AWAD HADRAMI, NASSER DAHER AL SHAMMARI, ABDUL RAHMAN SHALBY, SHAKER AAMER, ABDULLAH AALI AL OTIABI, MUHAMMED FAHAD AL QAHTANY, MUSA AL MADANY, SALEH ABDULLA AL-OSHAN, MOHAMMED SAAD MOHAMMED AL-OSHAN, ZABEN DHAHER AL SHAMMARI, MUHAMMED KHAN TUMANI, ABD AL NISR KHAN TUMANI, MOHAMMEDOU OULD SALAHI, YAHDIH OULD SALAHI, OMER SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHAMMED SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHSEN ABDRUB ABOASSY, MOHAMMED SAEED BIN SALMAN, SAMEER NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, ABDULLA AHDRUB ABOASSY, SAEED SALIM BISALMAN, NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, ADEL HAMLILY, SHAKER AAMER, MOHAMMED AL NADOUR, MOHAMMED FAHREO, LAHCEN IKASRIEN, MOHAMMED MAZOZ, MOUSSA, ABDUL LATIF MOHAMMED NASSER, SAID, RIDOUANE SHAKUR, YOUNIS SHAKUR, TAREQ, OMAR DEGHAYES, AHMED ABU IMRAN, NAJEEB AL HUSSEINI, BENJAMIN MOHAMMED AL HABASHI, SHAKER AAMER, KHIALI-GUL, YASIN MUHAMMED BASARDH, ALI HUSSIAN MOHAMMAD MUETY SHAABAN, NASRULLAH, ABDUL WAHAB, KARIN BOSTAN, TAJ MOHAMMAD, MOHAMMAD MUSTAFA SOHAIL, ARKAN MOHAMMAD GHAFIL AL KARIM, ASIM BEN THABIT AL-KHALAQI, KASIMBEKOV KOMOLIDDIN TOHIRJANOVICH, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, HONORGOL KHIALIGOL, HAJI NUSRAT, ABDUL WAHID, HAJI ROHULLAH WAKIL, MOHAMMAD WAKIL, SABAR LAL, MOHAMMED HASSAN, WALI MOHAMMED MORAFA, HADAYA MORAFA, ABDUL RAHMAN AZIZ KHAN, ABD AL RAHMAN, ABDUL RAZAK IKTIAR MOHAMMED, ALI SHAH MOUSOVI, MOHAMMAD SAYYED SHAH, IZAATULLAH NUSRAT, OMAR MOHAMMED KHALIFH, OMAR DEGHAYES, LABED AHMED, TARIQ MAHMOUD ALSAWAM, ABU ABDUL RAUF ZALITA, OMAR DEGHAYES, FARHI SAEED BIN MOHAMMED, MOAZZAM BEGG, MOTAI SAIB, BISHER AL-RAWI, FATIMA NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI, MOHAMMED NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, AHMED "DOE", OMAR DEGHAYES, JIHAD DHIAB, SHAKER AAMER, HAMMAD DOE, HUDHAIFA DOE, JALAAL DOE, KHALID DOE, SAABIR DOE, SAADIQ DOE, JAMAL KIYEMBA, ABDUSABUR DOE, ABDUSAMAD DOE, ABDUNASIR DOE, ADIL BIN MUHAMMAD AL WIRGHI, MOAZZAM BEGG, TAWISS BINT HASAN AL WIRGHI, ABDL HADI OMAR MAHMOUD FARAJ, MOHAMMED AMON, NABIL, JAMAAL KIYEMBA, SHAFIIQ, JAMAAL KIYEMBA, ABBAR SUFIAN AL HAWARY, SHAKER AAMER, BISHER AL-RAWI, IBRAHIM OSMAN IBRAHIM IDRIS, HASSAN BIN ATTASH, BENYAMIN MOHAMMED AL HABASHI, A'AMER SHAKER, HAMID AL RAZAK, BISHER AL RAWI, EDHAM MAMET, IBRAHIM MAMET, FOUZIA AHMMED, ABDUL RAHEEM GHULAM RABBANI, MALIKA, AHMMED GHULAM RABBANI, ABDUL ZAHIR, HUSSAIN SALEM MOHAMMED ALMERFEDI, SALEM MOHAMMED SALEM ABDULLA ALMERFEDI, WALEED SAEED BN SAEED ZAID, MOHAMMED SAEED BN SAEED ZAID, MOHAMMED RAJEB ABU GHANEM, HIMIGER SADER ABU GHANEM, AMEEN MOHAMMAD ALBKRI, ALI SALEH ALBKRI, ABDALHADI M. AL-SOPAI, ABDULLAH M. AL-SOPAI, ALLA ALI BIN ALI AHMED, WAGDI ALI BIN ALI, JAWAD JABBAR SADKHAN, JABBAR SADKHAN AL-SAHLANI, SADAR DOE, ARKEEN DOE, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, MOHAMMED AL-QAHTANI, MANEA AHMED FAHAD AL-QAHTANI, ISMAIL ALKHEMISI, HASAN BALGAID, OMAR DEGHAYES, RAVIL MINGAZA GAMIL, DILIARA MINGAZOVA, KHALED ABD ELGABAR MOHAMMED OTHMAN, ABD AL MALIK ABD AL WAHAB, MUHAMMED AHMED MUHAMMED ALGHURBANY, ALI HAMZA AHMED SULIMAN BAHLOOL, ABDOUL MOHAMMED AHMED BAHLOOL, SALEH MOHAMMED SELEH AL THABBII, FATMAH QHASIM AL AHMADI, ABDUL AL QADER AHMED HUSSAIN, ABDULGADER AHMED HASIN ABOBAKER, ISSAM HAMID ALI BIN ALI AL JAYFI, HAMID ALI AL JAYFI, OTHMAN ALI MOHAMMED AL SHAMRANY, ALI MOHAMED OMAR AL SHOMRANY, KHALID MOHAMMED AL THABBI, ABDU AL QADER HUSSAIN AL-MUDAFARI, SALIEH HUSSAIN ALI AL-MUDAFARI, HAYAL AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ALI AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ABD AL HAKIM GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, SAEED GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, MOHAMMED ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, ALI ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, AHMED BEN BACHA, BINYAM MOHAMMED, SALAH BELBACHA, GHASSAN ABDULLAH AL SHARBI, TOORAN MOHAMMAD AMANNULLAH, MIRRA JAAN, MOHAMMAD WABI UMARI, GUL HYAT KHAN, ABDULLAH MUJAHID HAQ, FARID AHMED, MOHAMMAD RAHIM, MOHAMMAD KARIM, MOHAMMAD ZAHIR, ABDUL WAHAB, ABDULLAH WAZIR ZADRAN, GHULAM ROOHANI, GHULAM JEELANI, DR. HIYATULLAH, ABDUL ZAHIR, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, ZAHIR SHAH, ABDUL HAQ, ABDUL BARRI, AHMED AL DARBY, AHMAD MOHAMMAD AL DARBI, ALI MOHAMMAD AL DARBI, MOHAMMED MOHAMMED HASSEN, ABDUL HAMID ABDUL SALAM AL-GHIZZAWI, ALI YEHYA MAHDI AL-RIMI, ADHAM MOHAMMED ALI AWAD, ISMAIL ALI AL RAMMI, SOAID SALH AHMAD AL RAMMI, ADEL ALI AHMAD AL RAMMI, SAMI MUHYIDEEN, BANDAR AL JAABIR, JAMAL KIYEMBA, MOHAMMED ZAHRANI, OMAR DEGHAYES, SALIM SAID, ANWAR HANDAN AL SHIMMIRI, SULIMAN HONAHEEM ALOWAIDAH, SAAD AL QAHTAANI, JOBRAN SAAD AL-QUHTANI, NAWAL MADAY AL-QUHTANI, ZAKARIA AL-BAIDANY, ABDEL AZIZ AL-SWIDI, AHMED MOHAMMED HASSIN AL RAMMAH, MOHAMMED AL PALESTINI, SOFAINE MOHAMMED BERHOUMI, ABDUL AZIZ NAJI, ABIN ALHAMED ABID ALSALLAM ALKESAWI, ABU RAWDA, UMAR ABDULLAH AL KUNDUZI, KHALED ABDALLAH AL-IDAN, ABDUL RAUF ASIBI, ABDUL RAZAK ALI, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH TAHA MATTAN, MAHER LNU, MAHER EL FALESTENY, MUSTAFA AL SHAMILI, SHARGOWI LNU, BISHER AL-RAWI, OYBEK JAMOLDINIVICH JABBAROV, SANAD ALI ALKALIEMI, FADL DAHIMI, ABDUL SALAM DEIFF, ABDURAHMAN LNU, AHMED OMAR, ALI LNU, EDRESS LNU, MOHAMMED AHMED SAEED HIDAR, SAIF ULLAH, SAMIR LNU, YOYEJ, SAEED, OMAR DOE, OMAR DEGHAYES, FAHD ABU HAFSA, JAMAL KIYEMBA, ABDUL HAQ, NADIR OMAR ADULLAH BIN SAADOUN ALSAARY, SAMI MUHYIDEEN, OMAR RAMAH, ABD AL ZAHER, FAWZI KHALED ABDALLAH AL-AUDHA, ABDULLAH BO OMER HAMZA YOYEJ, ABU RAHAN, NAJEEB DOE, SAD AL GAHTANI, AMER MOHAMMON, JABIR AL QUATANY, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, MOHSEN, FAHD AL FAWZAN, ADEL LNU, RASHED AL QAMDI, BANDAR AL SHAIBANI, ALI SHER HAMIDULLAH, MARSHAL DOE, KHALD AL BARKATI, ABDULAL AL THANI, ABU AHMED AL JOFI, SLAIM HARBI, ABU RAD AL JOFI, MUHAMMED HARBI, ABDULAZIZ LNU, ABDULAL DOE, SAD AL MATERI, BOUCETTA FIHI, SAYF BIN ABDALLAH, SEED FARHA, SALEH DOE, AHMED ADNAN AHJAM, MAGED DOE, ZEYAD AL GASSMY, ADEL HASSAN, HAMAD DOE, JAMIL AHMAD SAEED, HALA AHMAD SAEED AL-ADAHG, AMIR DOE, ALKHADR ABDULLAH AL YAFIE, TOFIQ NASSER AWAD AL BIHANI, ABU AHMED, WALEED DOE, WALEED LNU, SAMIR DOE, ELHAM BATAIF, ZEIN AL-ABEDEEN, YAGOOB AL SOURY, ABDUL RHMAN, ADEL AL TUNISI, ZAKER CHAN, SADER DOE, MOHAMMED AHMED SLAM AL-KHATEEB, ALI AL KAZMI, ADNAN AL BIHANI, ALI YAHYA MAHDI, ABDULLAH LNU, ABDURAZZAK LNU, KHADER DOE, BILAL LNU, MOSHEN DOE, ABDUL RAHMAN, ABDURRAZAKH LNU, FAHD DOE, JAMIL EL-BANNA, ADEL LNU, OSAMA DOE, MOHAMED HMADI, ABDUL-RAHMAN ABDO ABULGHAITH SULAIMAN, FAHMI DOE, ESAM DOE, TALAH AHMED MOHAMMED ALI ALMJRD, AHMED MOHAMMED ALI ALMJRD, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, ABDUR RAZAKAH, AHMAD DOE, ALI KADAMI, AYMAN, FAWAZ, HOUMAD WARZLY, MOHAMED RAJAB, OTHMAN ALI MUHAMMED OMAR, MOHAMMED KAMEEN, SABRY MOHAMMED, SALEH, WAQAS MOHAMMED ALI AWAD, ZAKARIA, KHALID MOHAMMED, MUHAMMAD NUR UTHMAN MUHAMMAD, MAHDI SALIH, SAKI BACHA, SHAMSULLAH, ABOU YASSIR JEZAIRI, ABDAL RAUF ZALITINI, ABDAUL RAZAK ALI-HAJ, ADNAN, AHAMED, SALAH DEEN IBN SHAIKH, SALIH, SALEH LIBI, ABD AL RAHMAN ABDULLAH AL HALMANDY, MUHAMMED SAAD IQBAL MADNI, SAID MADANY, ABDULLAH JAFFA, ABU HADIFA, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH, SANJAWEZ RAWEEL KAMEEL WEEJ, ABUL AZIZ AL MATRAFI, MAJED BARYAN, MOHAMED FAHAD SAAD AL ZU'BI, MOUSSA, ABDULRAHMAN, SAUD AL JOUHANY, SULTAN AL SHAREEF, ABDU TAWAB, ABDUL AZIZ, ABU RAWDAH, ABDUL AL HAMMAN, ABDUL LATIF, ABDULLA HAJI, ABDULLA, ADEL, INSHANULLAH, BITAL ADEL HALAMI, HISHAM, RAFIOVE BIN BASHIR, RIAD NARGERI, RIDAH, SAIF, MASOUD, ABDULLAH, ABDULLAH ALI SALEH, AMAR BILOUSHI, KHALID DESHIRE, IBRAHIM NAYIF ADBALLAH IBRAHIM, MOHAMMED CHINGUITY, ABDO ALI AL HAJ, ABU BAKER SHAMMRANY, GHANIM-ABDULRAHMAN AL-HARBI, RAVIL MINGAZOV, ZAINULABIDIN MEROZHEV, ELHAM BATTAYAV, ABDULLI FEGHOUL, WASIM, QAYED, ALI ABDULLAH ALI, MOHAMMED AHMED TAHER, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH MOHAMMED BA ODAH, TARIQ ALI ABDULLAH BA ODAH, NASSER ALI ABDULLAH BA ODAH, MAJID KHAN, RABIA KHAN, RAMZI BIN AL-SHIBH, ZAKARIA BIN AL-SHIBH, FAIZ AHMED YAHIA SULIMAN, HADDAD AHMED YAHIA SULIMAN, MOHAMED MUQBEL AHMED ALSABRI, MOHAMED AL-ZARNOUQI, MASHOUR ABDULLAH MUQBEL ALSABRI, ELISHER, SABIR, FADHEL HUSSEIN SALEH HENTIF, HAYKAL MOHAMMED SALEH HENTIF, ACHRAF SALIM ABDESSALAM, IYOB MURSHAD ALI SALEH, MURSHAD ALI SALEH, ABDULRAHMAN MUHAMMAD SALEH NASSER, MUHAMMAD MUHAMMAD SALEH NASSER, RIDAH BIN SALEH AL YAZIDI, SAMI AL HAJJ, ABDURRAHMAN ABDALLAH ALI MAHMOUD AL SHUBATI, ABDULLAH ALI MAHMOUD AL SHUBATI, ABDUL RAHIM HUSSEIN MUHAMMED ALI NASHIR, SCOTT L. FENSTERMAKER, BASHIR GHALAAB, SHAWALI KHAN, MOHAMMED SULAYMON BARRE, MOHAMMED ABD AL AL QADIR, ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI, AWAL GUL, HAMOUD ABDULLAH HAMOUD HASSAN AL WADY, SALEM AHMED HADI, MAHMMOUD OMAR MOHAMMED BIN ATEF, KAHLID SAAD MOHAMMED, MAHBUB RAHMAN, MOHAMMAD RAHMAN, SAMI AL HAJJ, MONSOOR MUHAMMED ALI QATTAA, SHAKHRUKH HAMIDUVA, ADINA HAMIDOVA, FNU HAFIZULLAH, MUIEEN ADEEN JAMAL ADEEN ABD AL F. ABD AL SATTAR, SHAWKI AWAD BALZUHAIR, YAKUBI, AHMED YASLAM SAID KUMAN, SHARIFULLAH, SUBHANULLAH, SAMI AL HAJJ, ABDULAH ALHAMIRI, ABDUL GHAFFAR, ADEL NOORI, ZAYN AL ABIDIN MUHAMMAD HUSAYN, MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK, SALIM JUMA KHAMISI, HASSAN ABDUL SAID, SAMI AL HAJJ, ISMAIL MOHAMED, ALI MOHAMED, KHAIRULLA KHAIRKHWA, SAMI AL HAJJ, MULLAH NORULLAH NOORI, SAMI AL HAJJ, MUHAMMAD AHMAD ABDALLAH AL ANSI, SAMI AL HAJJ, ABDUL RAHMAN UMIR AL QYATI, SAAD MASIR MUKBL AL AZANI, AMMAR AL-BALUCHI, MOHAMMED NAZIR BIN LEP, NADIR OMAR ABDULLAH BIN SA'ADO ALS'AARY (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Breckinridge, Alexander) (Entered: 05/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Briefs by OMAR KHADR, FATMAH ELSAMNAH, FALEN GHEREBI, MAHMOUD AHMED, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, FOADE YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, AREF ABD IL RHEEM, AREF ABD AL RAHIM, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, MAHMOAD ABDAH, MOHAMED FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, JAMAL MAR'I, NABIL MOHAMED MAR'I, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ADIL EL HAJ OBAID, NAZEM SAEED EL HAJ OBAID, MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, BASHIR MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, SADEQ MOHAMMED SAID, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, ABD ALSALAM MOHAMMED SAEED, FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF, SHEAB AL MOHAMEDI, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, ALL PETITIONERS, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, IBRAHIM AHMED MAHMOUD AL QOSI, SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA, ALI SALAH KAHLAH AL-MARRI, JARALLAH AL-MARRI, AHCENE ZEMIRI, KARINA DERESHTEANU, SHAKER ABDURRAHEEM AAMER, SAEED AHMED SIDDIQUE, OMAR DEGHAYES, TAHER DESGHAYES, JAMEL ABDULLAH KIYEMBA, THERESA NAMUDDU, RAMI BIN SAAD AL-OTEIBI, HANI SALEH RASHID ABDULLAH, YOSRA SALEH RASHID ABDULLAH, MAHMOOD SALIM AL MOHAMMED, ABDULLA SALIM AL-MOHAMMED, FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, OMAR DEGHAYES, SHERIF EL-MASHAD, WAFFA EL-ARABIE, ADEL FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, EAHME SALEM ALASSANI, SALEM SAED ALASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHY, ZAHER OMER BEN HAMDON, MOHAMMED OMER KHAMIS HAMDON, MOHAMMED AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MUHAMMAD AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MOHAMED ALI ABDULLA, MUHAMMAD ALI ABDULLAH BAWAZIR, SALIH ALI ABDULLAH BAWAZIR, FAHMI SALEM AL-ASSANI, SALEM SAID AL-ASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, ZAHIR OMAR KHAMIS BIN HAMDOON, MUHAMMAD OMAR KHAMIS BIN HAMDOON, SALEH ALI ABDULLA BAWAZER, AHMED ABDULLAH AL-WAZAN, YOUNOUS CHEKKOURI, MOHAMMED ABDUL RAHMAN, RAFIQ BIN BASHIR BIN JALLUL ALHAMI, DJAMEL AMEZIANE, AHAMED ABDUL AZIZ, SABIHA AWAD HADRAMI, NASSER DAHER AL SHAMMARI, ABDUL RAHMAN SHALBY, SHAKER AAMER, ABDULLAH AALI AL OTIABI, MUHAMMED FAHAD AL QAHTANY, MUSA AL MADANY, SALEH ABDULLA AL-OSHAN, MOHAMMED SAAD MOHAMMED AL-OSHAN, ZABEN DHAHER AL SHAMMARI, MUHAMMED KHAN TUMANI, ABD AL NISR KHAN TUMANI, MOHAMMEDOU OULD SALAHI, YAHDIH OULD SALAHI, OMER SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHAMMED SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHSEN ABDRUB ABOASSY, MOHAMMED SAEED BIN SALMAN, SAMEER NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, ABDULLA AHDRUB ABOASSY, SAEED SALIM BISALMAN, NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, ADEL HAMLILY, SHAKER AAMER, MOHAMMED AL NADOUR, MOHAMMED FAHREO, LAHCEN IKASRIEN, MOHAMMED MAZOZ, MOUSSA, ABDUL LATIF MOHAMMED NASSER, SAID, RIDOUANE SHAKUR, YOUNIS SHAKUR, TAREQ, OMAR DEGHAYES, AHMED ABU IMRAN, NAJEEB AL HUSSEINI, BENJAMIN MOHAMMED AL HABASHI, AHMED GHAPPOUR, CLIVE A. STAFFORD SMITH, SHAKER AAMER, KHIALI-GUL, YASIN MUHAMMED BASARDH, ALI HUSSIAN MOHAMMAD MUETY SHAABAN, NASRULLAH, ABDUL WAHAB, KARIN BOSTAN, TAJ MOHAMMAD, MOHAMMAD MUSTAFA SOHAIL, ARKAN MOHAMMAD GHAFIL AL KARIM, ASIM BEN THABIT AL-KHALAQI, KASIMBEKOV KOMOLIDDIN TOHIRJANOVICH, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, HONORGOL KHIALIGOL, HAJI NUSRAT, ABDUL WAHID, HAJI ROHULLAH WAKIL, MOHAMMAD WAKIL, SABAR LAL, MOHAMMED HASSAN, WALI MOHAMMED MORAFA, HADAYA MORAFA, ABDUL RAHMAN AZIZ KHAN, ABD AL RAHMAN, ABDUL RAZAK IKTIAR MOHAMMED, ALI SHAH MOUSOVI, MOHAMMAD SAYYED SHAH, IZAATULLAH NUSRAT, OMAR MOHAMMED KHALIFH, OMAR DEGHAYES, LABED AHMED, TARIQ MAHMOUD ALSAWAM, ABU ABDUL RAUF ZALITA, OMAR DEGHAYES, FARHI SAEED BIN MOHAMMED, MOAZZAM BEGG, MOTAI SAIB, BISHER AL-RAWI, FATIMA NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI, MOHAMMED NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, AHMED "DOE", OMAR DEGHAYES, JIHAD DHIAB, SHAKER AAMER, HAMMAD DOE, HUDHAIFA DOE, JALAAL DOE, KHALID DOE, SAABIR DOE, SAADIQ DOE, JAMAL KIYEMBA, ABDUSABUR DOE, ABDUSAMAD DOE, ABDUNASIR DOE, ADIL BIN MUHAMMAD AL WIRGHI, MOAZZAM BEGG, TAWISS BINT HASAN AL WIRGHI, ABDL HADI OMAR MAHMOUD FARAJ, MOHAMMED AMON, NABIL, JAMAAL KIYEMBA, SHAFIIQ, JAMAAL KIYEMBA, ABBAR SUFIAN AL HAWARY, SHAKER AAMER, BISHER AL-RAWI, IBRAHIM OSMAN IBRAHIM IDRIS, HASSAN BIN ATTASH, BENYAMIN MOHAMMED AL HABASHI, A'AMER SHAKER, HAMID AL RAZAK, BISHER AL RAWI, EDHAM MAMET, IBRAHIM MAMET, FOUZIA AHMMED, ABDUL RAHEEM GHULAM RABBANI, MALIKA, AHMMED GHULAM RABBANI, ABDUL ZAHIR, HUSSAIN SALEM MOHAMMED ALMERFEDI, SALEM MOHAMMED SALEM ABDULLA ALMERFEDI, WALEED SAEED BN SAEED ZAID, MOHAMMED SAEED BN SAEED ZAID, MOHAMMED RAJEB ABU GHANEM, HIMIGER SADER ABU GHANEM, AMEEN MOHAMMAD ALBKRI, ALI SALEH ALBKRI, ABDALHADI M. AL-SOPAI, ABDULLAH M. AL-SOPAI, ALLA ALI BIN ALI AHMED, WAGDI ALI BIN ALI, MUSA'AB AL MADHWANI, JAWAD JABBAR SADKHAN, JABBAR SADKHAN AL-SAHLANI, SADAR DOE, ARKEEN DOE, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, MOHAMMED AL-QAHTANI, MANEA AHMED FAHAD AL-QAHTANI, ISMAIL ALKHEMISI, HASAN BALGAID, OMAR DEGHAYES, RAVIL MINGAZA GAMIL, DILIARA MINGAZOVA, KHALED ABD ELGABAR MOHAMMED OTHMAN, ABD AL MALIK ABD AL WAHAB, MUHAMMED AHMED MUHAMMED ALGHURBANY, ALI HAMZA AHMED SULIMAN BAHLOOL, ABDOUL MOHAMMED AHMED BAHLOOL, SALEH MOHAMMED SELEH AL THABBII, FATMAH QHASIM AL AHMADI, ABDUL AL QADER AHMED HUSSAIN, ABDULGADER AHMED HASIN ABOBAKER, ISSAM HAMID ALI BIN ALI AL JAYFI, HAMID ALI AL JAYFI, OTHMAN ALI MOHAMMED AL SHAMRANY, ALI MOHAMED OMAR AL SHOMRANY, KHALID MOHAMMED AL THABBI, ABDU AL QADER HUSSAIN AL-MUDAFARI, SALIEH HUSSAIN ALI AL-MUDAFARI, HAYAL AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ALI AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ABD AL HAKIM GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, SAEED GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, MOHAMMED ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, ALI ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, AHMED BEN BACHA, BINYAM MOHAMMED, SALAH BELBACHA, GHASSAN ABDULLAH AL SHARBI, TOORAN MOHAMMAD AMANNULLAH, MIRRA JAAN, MOHAMMAD WABI UMARI, GUL HYAT KHAN, ABDULLAH MUJAHID HAQ, FARID AHMED, MOHAMMAD RAHIM, MOHAMMAD KARIM, MOHAMMAD ZAHIR, ABDUL WAHAB, ABDULLAH WAZIR ZADRAN, GHULAM ROOHANI, GHULAM JEELANI, DR. HIYATULLAH, ABDUL ZAHIR, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, ZAHIR SHAH, ABDUL HAQ, ABDUL BARRI, AHMED AL DARBY, AHMAD MOHAMMAD AL DARBI, ALI MOHAMMAD AL DARBI, MOHAMMED MOHAMMED HASSEN, ABDUL HAMID ABDUL SALAM AL-GHIZZAWI, ALI YEHYA MAHDI AL-RIMI, ADHAM MOHAMMED ALI AWAD, ISMAIL ALI AL RAMMI, SOAID SALH AHMAD AL RAMMI, ADEL ALI AHMAD AL RAMMI, ZAKARIA AL-BAIDANY, ABDEL AZIZ AL-SWIDI, AHMED MOHAMMED HASSIN AL RAMMAH, TALAH AHMED MOHAMMED ALI ALMJRD, AHMED MOHAMMED ALI ALMJRD, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, ABDUR RAZAKAH, AHMAD DOE, ALI KADAMI, AYMAN, FAWAZ, HOUMAD WARZLY, MOHAMED RAJAB, OTHMAN ALI MUHAMMED OMAR, MOHAMMED KAMEEN, SABRY MOHAMMED, SALEH, WAQAS MOHAMMED ALI AWAD, ZAKARIA, KHALID MOHAMMED, MUHAMMAD NUR UTHMAN MUHAMMAD, MAHDI SALIH, SAKI BACHA, SHAMSULLAH, ABOU YASSIR JEZAIRI, ABDAL RAUF ZALITINI, ABDAUL RAZAK ALI-HAJ, ADNAN, AHAMED, SALAH DEEN IBN SHAIKH, SALIH, SALEH LIBI, ABD AL RAHMAN ABDULLAH AL HALMANDY, MUHAMMED SAAD IQBAL MADNI, SAID MADANY, ABDULLAH JAFFA, ABU HADIFA, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH, SANJAWEZ RAWEEL KAMEEL WEEJ, ABUL AZIZ AL MATRAFI, MAJED BARYAN, MOHAMED FAHAD SAAD AL ZU'BI, MOUSSA, ABDULRAHMAN, SAUD AL JOUHANY, SULTAN AL SHAREEF, ABDU TAWAB, ABDUL AZIZ, ABU RAWDAH, ABDUL AL HAMMAN, ABDUL LATIF, ABDULLA HAJI, ABDULLA, ADEL, INSHANULLAH, BITAL ADEL HALAMI, HISHAM, RAFIOVE BIN BASHIR, RIAD NARGERI, RIDAH, SAIF, MASOUD, ABDULLAH, ABDULLAH ALI SALEH, AMAR BILOUSHI, KHALID DESHIRE, IBRAHIM NAYIF ADBALLAH IBRAHIM, MOHAMMED CHINGUITY, ABDO ALI AL HAJ, ABU BAKER SHAMMRANY, GHANIM-ABDULRAHMAN AL-HARBI, RAVIL MINGAZOV, ZAINULABIDIN MEROZHEV, ELHAM BATTAYAV, ABDULLI FEGHOUL, WASIM, QAYED, ALI ABDULLAH ALI, MOHAMMED AHMED TAHER, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH MOHAMMED BA ODAH, TARIQ ALI ABDULLAH BA ODAH, NASSER ALI ABDULLAH BA ODAH, RAMZI BIN AL-SHIBH, ZAKARIA BIN AL-SHIBH, FAIZ AHMED YAHIA SULIMAN, HADDAD AHMED YAHIA SULIMAN, MOHAMED MUQBEL AHMED ALSABRI, MOHAMED AL-ZARNOUQI, MASHOUR ABDULLAH MUQBEL ALSABRI, ELISHER, SABIR, FADHEL HUSSEIN SALEH HENTIF, HAYKAL MOHAMMED SALEH HENTIF, IYOB MURSHAD ALI SALEH, MURSHAD ALI SALEH, ABDULRAHMAN MUHAMMAD SALEH NASSER, MUHAMMAD MUHAMMAD SALEH NASSER, RIDAH BIN SALEH AL YAZIDI, SAMI AL HAJJ, ABDURRAHMAN ABDALLAH ALI MAHMOUD AL SHUBATI, ABDULLAH ALI MAHMOUD AL SHUBATI, AHMED ZAID SALEM ZUHAIR, MOAMMAR BADAWI DOKHAN, SAMI AL HAJJ, MOHAMED AL-ZARNOUQI, MASHOUR ABDULLAH MUQBEL ALSABRI, ABDUL RAHIM HUSSEIN MUHAMMED ALI NASHIR, SCOTT L. FENSTERMAKER, BASHIR GHALAAB, SHAWALI KHAN, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, MOHAMMED SULAYMON BARRE, MOHAMMED ABD AL AL QADIR, ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI, AWAL GUL, HAMOUD ABDULLAH HAMOUD HASSAN AL WADY, SALEM AHMED HADI, MAHMMOUD OMAR MOHAMMED BIN ATEF, KAHLID SAAD MOHAMMED, MAHBUB RAHMAN, MOHAMMAD RAHMAN, SAMI AL HAJJ, MONSOOR MUHAMMED ALI QATTAA, SHAKHRUKH HAMIDUVA, ADINA HAMIDOVA, FNU HAFIZULLAH, MUIEEN ADEEN JAMAL ADEEN ABD AL F. ABD AL SATTAR, SHAWKI AWAD BALZUHAIR, YAKUBI, AHMED YASLAM SAID KUMAN, SHARIFULLAH, SUBHANULLAH, SAMI AL HAJJ, ABDULAH ALHAMIRI, ABDUL GHAFFAR, ADEL NOORI, ZAYN AL ABIDIN MUHAMMAD HUSAYN, MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK, SALIM JUMA KHAMISI, HASSAN ABDUL SAID, SAMI AL HAJJ, KHAIRULLA KHAIRKHWA, SAMI AL HAJJ, MULLAH NORULLAH NOORI, SAMI AL HAJJ, MUHAMMAD AHMAD ABDALLAH AL ANSI, SAMI AL HAJJ, ABDUL RAHMAN UMIR AL QYATI, SAAD MASIR MUKBL AL AZANI, AMMAR AL-BALUCHI, MOHAMMED NAZIR BIN LEP, ABU RAWDA, ABDUL RAZAK ALI, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH TAHA MATTAN, SHARGOWI LNU, ABDURAHMAN LNU, AHMED OMAR, EDRESS LNU, MOHAMMED AHMED SLAM AL-KHATEEB, MANSOUR K. A. KAMEL, ABDULAZIZ SAYER OWAIN AL SHAMMARI, SAYER O. Z. AL SHAMMARI, ABDULLAH SALEH ALI AL AJMI, MESFER SALEH ALI AL AJMI, MOHAMMED FUNAITEL AL DIHANI, MUBARA F. S. M. AL DAIHANI, FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI, MOHAMMAD A. J. M. H. AL KANDARI, FWAD MAHMOUD AL RABIAH, MONZER M. H. A. AL RABIEAH, ADIL ZAMIL ABDULL MOHSSIN AL ZAMIL, WALID Z. A. AL ZAMEL, FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH, KHALED A.F. AL ODAH, NASSER NIJER NASER AL MUTAIRI, ABDULLAH KAMAL ABDULLAH KAMAL AL KANDARI, SAAD MADAI SAAD HAWASH AL-AZMI, HAMAD MADAI SAAD, OMAR RAJAB AMIN, MOHAMMAD R.M.R. AMEEN, NAYEF N. N. B. J. AL MUTAIRI, KHALID ABDULLAH MISHAL AL MUTAIRI, MESHAL A. M. TH AL MUTAIRI (Ryan, Peter) (Entered: 05/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to opposition to motion re (263 in 1:04-cv-01136-JDB, 73 in 1:08-cv-01104-CKK, 89 in 1:08-cv-01237-RMU-AK, 91 in 1:07-cv-02337-HHK, 77 in 1:08-cv-01310-RMU, 142 in 1:05-cv-00764-CKK-AK, 106 in 1:06-cv-01766-HHK, 85 in 1:08-cv-01236-JDB, 66 in 1:08-cv-01228-RMC, 6 in 1:09-cv-00031-JDB, 175 in 1:05-cv-00329-PLF, 115 in 1:06-cv-01668-HHK, 92 in 1:08-cv-01238-RWR, 58 in 1:08-cv-01223-JR, 127 in 1:05-cv-00877-JR, 68 in 1:08-cv-01232-JR, 86 in 1:08-cv-01101-JDB, 115 in 1:08-cv-01360-RWR, 257 in 1:04-cv-02022-PLF, 144 in 1:06-cv-01684-GK, 460 in 1:04-cv-01254-HHK, 217 in 1:05-cv-00023-RWR, 100 in 1:06-cv-01758-RMC, 104 in 1:07-cv-01710-RBW, 98 in 1:06-cv-01765-HHK, 170 in 1:05-cv-00763-JDB, 53 in 1:08-cv-01923-GK, 127 in 1:04-cv-02035-GK, 91 in 1:08-cv-01233-ESH, 172 in 1:05-cv-00359-UNA, 1064 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW, 92 in 1:04-cv-01937-PLF, 44 in 1:06-cv-01759-JDB, 400 in 1:04-cv-01194-TFH, 36 in 1:08-cv-01828-RMU, 160 in 1:05-cv-00492-JR, 84 in 1:08-cv-01235-JDB, 177 in 1:05-cv-00392-UNA, 91 in 1:08-cv-00987-JDB, 156 in 1:04-cv-02046-CKK, 138 in 1:06-cv-01767-RMU, 199 in 1:05-cv-00270-JR, 140 in 1:05-cv-00748-RMC, 103 in 1:06-cv-00618-RWR, 160 in 1:06-cv-01690-RBW, 103 in 1:07-cv-02338-HHK, 1684 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 142 in 1:04-cv-02215-RMC, 37 in 1:08-cv-01229-JDB, 62 in 1:08-cv-01805-RMU, 58 in 1:05-cv-02444-RMC, 44 in 1:08-cv-01227-ESH, 114 in 1:06-cv-01761-ESH, 83 in 1:08-cv-01230-RMC, 138 in 1:05-cv-00634-RWR, 92 in 1:08-cv-01153-HHK, 83 in 1:08-cv-01221-CKK, 58 in 1:08-cv-02019-RBW, 72 in 1:08-cv-01224-RMC, 161 in 1:05-cv-00526-RMU, 76 in 1:08-cv-01085-PLF, 197 in 1:04-cv-01164-RBW, 37 in 1:08-cv-02083-PLF, 502 in 1:02-cv-00828-UNA, 105 in 1:08-cv-01207-RWR, 39 in 1:08-cv-01733-JDB, 218 in 1:05-cv-00520-RMU, 187 in 1:05-cv-00569-JR, 194 in 1:05-cv-02479-HHK, 302 in 1:05-cv-00280-UNA, 59 in 1:08-cv-01440-CKK, 70 in 1:08-cv-01185-HHK, 42 in 1:08-cv-01231-CKK, 161 in 1:05-cv-00247-UNA) MOTION to Amend/Correct SEPTEMBER 11, 2008 PROTECTIVE ORDER AND COUNSEL ACCESS PROCEDURES AND JANUARY 9, 2009 AMENDED TS/SCI PROTECTIVE ORDER AND COUNSEL ACCESS PROCEDURES filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, BARACK OBAMA, ROBERT GATES. (Berman, Julia) (Entered: 05/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/22/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER setting hearing on Motion for Reconsideration (Dkt. No. 1755, 08-mc-0442) for June 8, 2009 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 25A before Judge Thomas F. Hogan. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 5/22/09. (lctfh1) (Entered: 05/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Henry, Terry) (Entered: 05/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of the Governments Motion to Amend September 11, 2008 Protective Order and Counsel Access Procedures and January 9, 2009 Amended TS/SCI Protective Order and Counsel Access Procedures by GEORGE W. BUSH, BARACK OBAMA, ROBERT GATES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berman, Julia) (Entered: 05/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Order -- CONSOLIDATED ORDER REGARDING TASK FORCE DISCOVERY by BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order 1, # 3 Text of Proposed Order 2, # 4 Exhibit Perrelli Declaration, # 5 Exhibit Olsen Declaration, # 6 Exhibit Benkert Declaration, # 7 Exhibit Cummings Declaration, # 8 Exhibit Hackett Declaration)(Henry, Terry) (Entered: 05/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Reconsideration OF ORDERS REGARDING DISCOVERY FROM THE GUANTANAMO REVIEW TASK FORCE by JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, BARACK OBAMA, BRICE GYURISKO, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, ROBERT M. GATES (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order 1, # 3 Text of Proposed Order 2, # 4 Exhibit Perrelli Declaration, # 5 Exhibit Olsen Declaration, # 6 Exhibit Benkert Declaration, # 7 Exhibit Cummings Declaration, # 8 Exhibit Hackett Declaration)(Henry, Terry) (Entered: 05/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE re (263 in 1:04-cv-01136-JDB, 73 in 1:08-cv-01104-CKK, 89 in 1:08-cv-01237-RMU-AK, 91 in 1:07-cv-02337-HHK, 77 in 1:08-cv-01310-RMU, 142 in 1:05-cv-00764-CKK-AK, 106 in 1:06-cv-01766-HHK, 85 in 1:08-cv-01236-JDB, 66 in 1:08-cv-01228-RMC, 6 in 1:09-cv-00031-JDB, 175 in 1:05-cv-00329-PLF, 115 in 1:06-cv-01668-HHK, 92 in 1:08-cv-01238-RWR, 58 in 1:08-cv-01223-JR, 127 in 1:05-cv-00877-JR, 68 in 1:08-cv-01232-JR, 86 in 1:08-cv-01101-JDB, 1064 in 1:09-cv-00745-RCL, 115 in 1:08-cv-01360-RWR, 257 in 1:04-cv-02022-PLF, 144 in 1:06-cv-01684-GK, 460 in 1:04-cv-01254-HHK, 100 in 1:06-cv-01758-RMC, 104 in 1:07-cv-01710-RBW, 98 in 1:06-cv-01765-HHK, 170 in 1:05-cv-00763-JDB, 53 in 1:08-cv-01923-GK, 114 in 1:05-cv-02387-RMC, 127 in 1:04-cv-02035-GK, 91 in 1:08-cv-01233-ESH, 172 in 1:05-cv-00359-UNA, 1064 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW, 92 in 1:04-cv-01937-PLF, 44 in 1:06-cv-01759-JDB, 400 in 1:04-cv-01194-TFH, 36 in 1:08-cv-01828-RMU, 160 in 1:05-cv-00492-JR, 84 in 1:08-cv-01235-JDB, 177 in 1:05-cv-00392-UNA, 91 in 1:08-cv-00987-JDB, 156 in 1:04-cv-02046-CKK, 138 in 1:06-cv-01767-RMU, 199 in 1:05-cv-00270-JR, 140 in 1:05-cv-00748-RMC, 103 in 1:06-cv-00618-RWR, 160 in 1:06-cv-01690-RBW, 103 in 1:07-cv-02338-HHK, 1684 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 142 in 1:04-cv-02215-RMC, 37 in 1:08-cv-01229-JDB, 62 in 1:08-cv-01805-RMU, 58 in 1:05-cv-02444-RMC, 44 in 1:08-cv-01227-ESH, 114 in 1:06-cv-01761-ESH, 83 in 1:08-cv-01230-RMC, 138 in 1:05-cv-00634-RWR, 92 in 1:08-cv-01153-HHK, 83 in 1:08-cv-01221-CKK, 58 in 1:08-cv-02019-RBW, 72 in 1:08-cv-01224-RMC, 161 in 1:05-cv-00526-RMU, 76 in 1:08-cv-01085-PLF, 197 in 1:04-cv-01164-RBW, 37 in 1:08-cv-02083-PLF, 105 in 1:08-cv-01207-RWR, 502 in 1:02-cv-00828-UNA, 39 in 1:08-cv-01733-JDB, 218 in 1:05-cv-00520-RMU, 187 in 1:05-cv-00569-JR, 194 in 1:05-cv-02479-HHK, 302 in 1:05-cv-00280-UNA, 59 in 1:08-cv-01440-CKK, 70 in 1:08-cv-01185-HHK, 42 in 1:08-cv-01231-CKK, 161 in 1:05-cv-00247-UNA) MOTION to Amend/Correct PETITIONER'S RESPONSE TO GOVERNMENT'S MOTION TO AMEND SEPTEMBER 11, 2008 PROTECTIVE ORDER AND COUNSEL ACCESS PROCEDURES AND JANUARY 9, 2009 TS/SCI PROTECTIVE ORDER AND COUNSEL ACCESS PROCEDURES filed by OMAR KHADR, FATMAH ELSAMNAH, FALEN GHEREBI, BISHER NASER ALI ALMARWALH, HUISSEN NASER ALI ALMARWALH, MASAAB OMAR AL-MADHWANI, ALI OMAR MADHWANI, ABDULKHALIQ AL-BAIDHANI, KHALID AL-BAIDHANI, ALI AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, ABDULLAH AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, SUHAIL ABDU ANAM, SAEED AHMED AL-SARIM, SAMIR AHMED AL-SARIM, IMAD ABDULLAH HASSAN, AMRO ABDULLAH HASSAN, JALAL SALIM BIN AMER, FAEZ BIN AMER, ALI YAHYA MAHDI, MOHAMED YAHYA MAHDI, ATAG ALI ABDOH, MOHAMED ABDU ANAM, KHALID AHMED KASSIM, FADHLE AHMED KASSIM, FAHMI ABDULLAH AHMED, KMAL ABDULLAH AHMED, ABDUALAZIZ ABDOH AL SWIDI, ADNAN ABDOH ALSWIDI, AL HUSSIN AL-TIS, HADI HUSSIN AL-TIS, FAHMI ABDULLAH UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, ALL PETITIONERS, ABDULLAH AHMED UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, MAHMOUD AHMED, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, FOADE YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, AREF ABD IL RHEEM, AREF ABD AL RAHIM, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, MAHMOAD ABDAH, MOHAMED FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, JAMAL MAR'I, NABIL MOHAMED MAR'I, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ADIL EL HAJ OBAID, NAZEM SAEED EL HAJ OBAID, MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, BASHIR MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, SADEQ MOHAMMED SAID, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, ABD ALSALAM MOHAMMED SAEED, FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF, SHEAB AL MOHAMEDI, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, IBRAHIM AHMED MAHMOUD AL QOSI, SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA, ALI SALAH KAHLAH AL-MARRI, JARALLAH AL-MARRI, AHCENE ZEMIRI, KARINA DERESHTEANU, SHAKER ABDURRAHEEM AAMER, SAEED AHMED SIDDIQUE, OMAR DEGHAYES, TAHER DESGHAYES, JAMEL ABDULLAH KIYEMBA, THERESA NAMUDDU, MAHMOOD SALIM AL MOHAMMED, ABDULLA SALIM AL-MOHAMMED, FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, OMAR DEGHAYES, SHERIF EL-MASHAD, WAFFA EL-ARABIE, ADEL FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, EAHME SALEM ALASSANI, SALEM SAED ALASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHY, ZAHER OMER BEN HAMDON, MOHAMMED OMER KHAMIS HAMDON, MOHAMMED AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MUHAMMAD AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MOHAMED ALI ABDULLA, MUHAMMAD ALI ABDULLAH BAWAZIR, SALIH ALI ABDULLAH BAWAZIR, FAHMI SALEM AL-ASSANI, SALEM SAID AL-ASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, ZAHIR OMAR KHAMIS BIN HAMDOON, MUHAMMAD OMAR KHAMIS BIN HAMDOON, SALEH ALI ABDULLA BAWAZER, AHMED ABDULLAH AL-WAZAN, YOUNOUS CHEKKOURI, MOHAMMED ABDUL RAHMAN, RAFIQ BIN BASHIR BIN JALLUL ALHAMI, DJAMEL AMEZIANE, AHAMED ABDUL AZIZ, SABIHA AWAD HADRAMI, NASSER DAHER AL SHAMMARI, ABDUL RAHMAN SHALBY, SHAKER AAMER, ABDULLAH AALI AL OTIABI, MUHAMMED FAHAD AL QAHTANY, MUSA AL MADANY, SALEH ABDULLA AL-OSHAN, MOHAMMED SAAD MOHAMMED AL-OSHAN, ZABEN DHAHER AL SHAMMARI, MUHAMMED KHAN TUMANI, ABD AL NISR KHAN TUMANI, MOHAMMEDOU OULD SALAHI, YAHDIH OULD SALAHI, OMER SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHAMMED SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHSEN ABDRUB ABOASSY, MOHAMMED SAEED BIN SALMAN, SAMEER NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, ABDULLA AHDRUB ABOASSY, SAEED SALIM BISALMAN, NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, ADEL HAMLILY, SHAKER AAMER, MOHAMMED AL NADOUR, MOHAMMED FAHREO, LAHCEN IKASRIEN, MOHAMMED MAZOZ, MOUSSA, ABDUL LATIF MOHAMMED NASSER, SAID, RIDOUANE SHAKUR, YOUNIS SHAKUR, TAREQ, OMAR DEGHAYES, AHMED ABU IMRAN, NAJEEB AL HUSSEINI, KHIALI-GUL, YASIN MUHAMMED BASARDH, ALI HUSSIAN MOHAMMAD MUETY SHAABAN, KARIN BOSTAN, MOHAMMAD MUSTAFA SOHAIL, ARKAN MOHAMMAD GHAFIL AL KARIM, ASIM BEN THABIT AL-KHALAQI, KASIMBEKOV KOMOLIDDIN TOHIRJANOVICH, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, HONORGOL KHIALIGOL, HAJI NUSRAT, ABDUL WAHID, HAJI ROHULLAH WAKIL, MOHAMMAD WAKIL, SABAR LAL, MOHAMMED HASSAN, WALI MOHAMMED MORAFA, HADAYA MORAFA, ABDUL RAHMAN AZIZ KHAN, ABD AL RAHMAN, ABDUL RAZAK IKTIAR MOHAMMED, ALI SHAH MOUSOVI, MOHAMMAD SAYYED SHAH, IZAATULLAH NUSRAT, OMAR MOHAMMED KHALIFH, OMAR DEGHAYES, TARIQ MAHMOUD ALSAWAM, ABU ABDUL RAUF ZALITA, OMAR DEGHAYES, FARHI SAEED BIN MOHAMMED, MOAZZAM BEGG, MOTAI SAIB, BISHER AL-RAWI, FATIMA NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI, MOHAMMED NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, AHMED "DOE", OMAR DEGHAYES, JIHAD DHIAB, SHAKER AAMER, JAWAD JABBAR SADKHAN, HAMMAD DOE, HUDHAIFA DOE, JALAAL DOE, KHALID DOE, SAABIR DOE, SAADIQ DOE, JAMAL KIYEMBA, ABDUSABUR DOE, ABDUSAMAD DOE, ABDUNASIR DOE, ADIL BIN MUHAMMAD AL WIRGHI, MOAZZAM BEGG, TAWISS BINT HASAN AL WIRGHI, ABDL HADI OMAR MAHMOUD FARAJ, NABIL, JAMAAL KIYEMBA, SHAFIIQ, JAMAAL KIYEMBA, ABBAR SUFIAN AL HAWARY, SHAKER AAMER, BISHER AL-RAWI, IBRAHIM OSMAN IBRAHIM IDRIS, HASSAN BIN ATTASH, BENYAMIN MOHAMMED AL HABASHI, A'AMER SHAKER, HAMID AL RAZAK, BISHER AL RAWI, EDHAM MAMET, IBRAHIM MAMET, FOUZIA AHMMED, ABDUL RAHEEM GHULAM RABBANI, MALIKA, AHMMED GHULAM RABBANI, ABDUL ZAHIR, HUSSAIN SALEM MOHAMMED ALMERFEDI, SALEM MOHAMMED SALEM ABDULLA ALMERFEDI, WALEED SAEED BN SAEED ZAID, MOHAMMED SAEED BN SAEED ZAID, MOHAMMED RAJEB ABU GHANEM, HIMIGER SADER ABU GHANEM, AMEEN MOHAMMAD ALBKRI, ALI SALEH ALBKRI, ALLA ALI BIN ALI AHMED, WAGDI ALI BIN ALI, SADAR DOE, ARKEEN DOE, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, MOHAMMED AL-QAHTANI, MANEA AHMED FAHAD AL-QAHTANI, ISMAIL ALKHEMISI, HASAN BALGAID, OMAR DEGHAYES, RAVIL MINGAZA GAMIL, DILIARA MINGAZOVA, KHALED ABD ELGABAR MOHAMMED OTHMAN, ABD AL MALIK ABD AL WAHAB, MUHAMMED AHMED MUHAMMED ALGHURBANY, ALI HAMZA AHMED SULIMAN BAHLOOL, ABDOUL MOHAMMED AHMED BAHLOOL, SALEH MOHAMMED SELEH AL THABBII, FATMAH QHASIM AL AHMADI, ABDUL AL QADER AHMED HUSSAIN, ABDULGADER AHMED HASIN ABOBAKER, ISSAM HAMID ALI BIN ALI AL JAYFI, HAMID ALI AL JAYFI, OTHMAN ALI MOHAMMED AL SHAMRANY, ALI MOHAMED OMAR AL SHOMRANY, KHALID MOHAMMED AL THABBI, ABDU AL QADER HUSSAIN AL-MUDAFARI, SALIEH HUSSAIN ALI AL-MUDAFARI, HAYAL AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ALI AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ABD AL HAKIM GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, SAEED GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, MOHAMMED ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, ALI ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, AHMED BEN BACHA, BINYAM MOHAMMED, SALAH BELBACHA, TOORAN MOHAMMAD AMANNULLAH, MIRRA JAAN, MOHAMMAD WABI UMARI, GUL HYAT KHAN, ABDULLAH MUJAHID HAQ, FARID AHMED, MOHAMMAD RAHIM, MOHAMMAD KARIM, MOHAMMAD ZAHIR, ABDUL WAHAB, ABDULLAH WAZIR ZADRAN, GHULAM ROOHANI, GHULAM JEELANI, DR. HIYATULLAH, ABDUL ZAHIR, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, ZAHIR SHAH, ABDUL HAQ, ABDUL BARRI, AHMED AL DARBY, AHMAD MOHAMMAD AL DARBI, ALI MOHAMMAD AL DARBI, MOHAMMED MOHAMMED HASSEN, ABDUL HAMID ABDUL SALAM AL-GHIZZAWI, ALI YEHYA MAHDI AL-RIMI, ADHAM MOHAMMED ALI AWAD, ISMAIL ALI AL RAMMI, SOAID SALH AHMAD AL RAMMI, ADEL ALI AHMAD AL RAMMI, SAMI MUHYIDEEN, BANDAR AL JAABIR, JAMAL KIYEMBA, MOHAMMED ZAHRANI, OMAR DEGHAYES, SALIM SAID, ANWAR HANDAN AL SHIMMIRI, SULIMAN HONAHEEM ALOWAIDAH, SAAD AL QAHTAANI, JOBRAN SAAD AL-QUHTANI, NAWAL MADAY AL-QUHTANI, ZAKARIA AL-BAIDANY, ABDEL AZIZ AL-SWIDI, AHMED MOHAMMED HASSIN AL RAMMAH, MOHAMMED AL PALESTINI, OMAR (LNU), SOFAINE MOHAMMED BERHOUMI, ABDUL AZIZ NAJI, ABIN ALHAMED ABID ALSALLAM ALKESAWI, UMAR ABDULLAH AL KUNDUZI, KHALED ABDALLAH AL-IDAN, ABDUL RAUF ASIBI, MAHER LNU, MUSTAFA AL SHAMILI, BISHER AL-RAWI, OYBEK JAMOLDINIVICH JABBAROV, SANAD ALI ALKALIEMI, FADL DAHIMI, ABDUL SALAM DEIFF, ALI LNU, MOHAMMED AHMED SAEED HIDAR, SAIF ULLAH, SAMIR LNU, YOYEJ, SAEED, OMAR DOE, SHARAF AL SANANI, OMAR DEGHAYES, FAHD ABU HAFSA, JAMAL KIYEMBA, ABDUL HAQ, NADIR OMAR ADULLAH BIN SAADOUN ALSAARY, SAMI MUHYIDEEN, OMAR RAMAH, ABD AL ZAHER, FAWZI KHALED ABDALLAH AL-AUDHA, ABDULLAH BO OMER HAMZA YOYEJ, ABU RAHAN, NAJEEB DOE, SAD AL GAHTANI, AMER MOHAMMON, FAHD AL HARAAZI, JABIR AL QUATANY, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, MOHSEN, FAHD AL FAWZAN, ADEL LNU, RASHED AL QAMDI, BANDAR AL SHAIBANI, ALI SHER HAMIDULLAH, MARSHAL DOE, KHALD AL BARKATI, ABDULAL AL THANI, ABU AHMED AL JOFI, SLAIM HARBI, ABU RAD AL JOFI, MUHAMMED HARBI, ABDULAZIZ LNU, ABDULAL DOE, SAD AL MATERI, BOUCETTA FIHI, SAYF BIN ABDALLAH, SEED FARHA, SALEH DOE, AHMED ADNAN AHJAM, MAGED DOE, ZEYAD AL GASSMY, ADEL HASSAN, HAMAD DOE, JAMIL AHMAD SAEED, HALA AHMAD SAEED AL-ADAHG, AMIR DOE, ALKHADR ABDULLAH AL YAFIE, TOFIQ NASSER AWAD AL BIHANI, ABU AHMED, WALEED DOE, WALEED LNU, SAMIR DOE, ELHAM BATAIF, ZEIN AL-ABEDEEN, YAGOOB AL SOURY, ABDUL RHMAN, ADEL AL TUNISI, ZAKER CHAN, SADER DOE, ALI AL KAZMI, ADNAN AL BIHANI, ALI YAHYA MAHDI, ABDULLAH LNU, ABDURAZZAK LNU, KHADER DOE, BILAL LNU, MOSHEN DOE, ABDUL RAHMAN, ABDURRAZAKH LNU, FAHD DOE, JAMIL EL-BANNA, ADEL LNU, OSAMA DOE, MOHAMED HMADI, ABDUL-RAHMAN ABDO ABULGHAITH SULAIMAN, FAHMI DOE, ESAM DOE, TALAH AHMED MOHAMMED ALI ALMJRD, AHMED MOHAMMED ALI ALMJRD, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, ABDUR RAZAKAH, AHMAD DOE, ALI KADAMI, AYMAN, FAWAZ, HOUMAD WARZLY, MOHAMED RAJAB, OTHMAN ALI MUHAMMED OMAR, MOHAMMED KAMEEN, SABRY MOHAMMED, SALEH, WAQAS MOHAMMED ALI AWAD, ZAKARIA, KHALID MOHAMMED, MUHAMMAD NUR UTHMAN MUHAMMAD, MAHDI SALIH, SAKI BACHA, SHAMSULLAH, ABOU YASSIR JEZAIRI, ABDAL RAUF ZALITINI, ABDAUL RAZAK ALI-HAJ, ADNAN, AHAMED, SALAH DEEN IBN SHAIKH, SALIH, SALEH LIBI, ABD AL RAHMAN ABDULLAH AL HALMANDY, MUHAMMED SAAD IQBAL MADNI, SAID MADANY, ABDULLAH JAFFA, ABU HADIFA, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH, SANJAWEZ RAWEEL KAMEEL WEEJ, ABUL AZIZ AL MATRAFI, MAJED BARYAN, MOHAMED FAHAD SAAD AL ZU'BI, MOUSSA, ABDULRAHMAN, SAUD AL JOUHANY, SULTAN AL SHAREEF, ABDU TAWAB, ABDUL AZIZ, ABU RAWDAH, ABDUL AL HAMMAN, ABDUL LATIF, ABDULLA HAJI, ABDULLA, ADEL, INSHANULLAH, BITAL ADEL HALAMI, HISHAM, RAFIOVE BIN BASHIR, RIAD NARGERI, RIDAH, SAIF, MASOUD, ABDULLAH, ABDULLAH ALI SALEH, AMAR BILOUSHI, KHALID DESHIRE, IBRAHIM NAYIF ADBALLAH IBRAHIM, MOHAMMED CHINGUITY, ABDO ALI AL HAJ, ABU BAKER SHAMMRANY, GHANIM-ABDULRAHMAN AL-HARBI, RAVIL MINGAZOV, ZAINULABIDIN MEROZHEV, ELHAM BATTAYAV, ABDULLI FEGHOUL, ALI ABDULLAH ALI, MOHAMMED AHMED TAHER, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH MOHAMMED BA ODAH, TARIQ ALI ABDULLAH BA ODAH, NASSER ALI ABDULLAH BA ODAH, MAJID KHAN, RABIA KHAN, FAIZ AHMED YAHIA SULIMAN, HADDAD AHMED YAHIA SULIMAN, MOHAMED MUQBEL AHMED ALSABRI, MOHAMED AL-ZARNOUQI, MASHOUR ABDULLAH MUQBEL ALSABRI, ELISHER, SABIR, FADHEL HUSSEIN SALEH HENTIF, HAYKAL MOHAMMED SALEH HENTIF, ACHRAF SALIM ABDESSALAM, IYOB MURSHAD ALI SALEH, MURSHAD ALI SALEH, ABDULRAHMAN MUHAMMAD SALEH NASSER, MUHAMMAD MUHAMMAD SALEH NASSER, RIDAH BIN SALEH AL YAZIDI, SAMI AL HAJJ, ABDURRAHMAN ABDALLAH ALI MAHMOUD AL SHUBATI, ABDULLAH ALI MAHMOUD AL SHUBATI, MOAMMAR BADAWI DOKHAN, SAMI AL HAJJ, ABDUL RAHIM HUSSEIN MUHAMMED ALI NASHIR, SCOTT L. FENSTERMAKER, BASHIR GHALAAB, SHAWALI KHAN, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, MOHAMMED SULAYMON BARRE, MOHAMMED ABD AL AL QADIR, ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI, AWAL GUL, HAMOUD ABDULLAH HAMOUD HASSAN AL WADY, SALEM AHMED HADI, MAHMMOUD OMAR MOHAMMED BIN ATEF, KAHLID SAAD MOHAMMED, MAHBUB RAHMAN, MOHAMMAD RAHMAN, SAMI AL HAJJ, MONSOOR MUHAMMED ALI QATTAA, SHAKHRUKH HAMIDUVA, ADINA HAMIDOVA, FNU HAFIZULLAH, MUIEEN ADEEN JAMAL ADEEN ABD AL F. ABD AL SATTAR, SHAWKI AWAD BALZUHAIR, YAKUBI, AHMED YASLAM SAID KUMAN, ABDULAH ALHAMIRI, ABDUL GHAFFAR, ADEL NOORI, ZAYN AL ABIDIN MUHAMMAD HUSAYN, MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK, SALIM JUMA KHAMISI, HASSAN ABDUL SAID, SAMI AL HAJJ, KHAIRULLA KHAIRKHWA, SAMI AL HAJJ, MULLAH NORULLAH NOORI, SAMI AL HAJJ, MUHAMMAD AHMAD ABDALLAH AL ANSI, SAMI AL HAJJ, ABDUL RAHMAN UMIR AL QYATI, SAAD MASIR MUKBL AL AZANI, AMMAR AL-BALUCHI, MOHAMMED NAZIR BIN LEP, ABU RAWDA, ABDUL RAZAK ALI, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH TAHA MATTAN, SHARGOWI LNU, ABDURAHMAN LNU, AHMED OMAR, EDRESS LNU, MOHAMMED AHMED SLAM AL-KHATEEB, MANSOUR K. A. KAMEL, ABDULAZIZ SAYER OWAIN AL SHAMMARI, SAYER O. Z. AL SHAMMARI, ABDULLAH SALEH ALI AL AJMI, MESFER SALEH ALI AL AJMI, MOHAMMED FUNAITEL AL DIHANI, MUBARA F. S. M. AL DAIHANI, FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI, MOHAMMAD A. J. M. H. AL KANDARI, FWAD MAHMOUD AL RABIAH, MONZER M. H. A. AL RABIEAH, ADIL ZAMIL ABDULL MOHSSIN AL ZAMIL, WALID Z. A. AL ZAMEL, FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH, KHALED A.F. AL ODAH, NASSER NIJER NASER AL MUTAIRI, ABDULLAH KAMAL ABDULLAH KAMAL AL KANDARI, SAAD MADAI SAAD HAWASH AL-AZMI, HAMAD MADAI SAAD, OMAR RAJAB AMIN, MOHAMMAD R.M.R. AMEEN, NAYEF N. N. B. J. AL MUTAIRI, KHALID ABDULLAH MISHAL AL MUTAIRI, MESHAL A. M. TH AL MUTAIRI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Declararion Brown, # 2 Exhibit B-Declaration Abraham, # 3 Exhibit C-Status Report)(Thompson, Darin) (Entered: 05/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT -- UPDATED STATUS REPORT CONCERNING DISCOVERY RELATED TO INFORMATION IN THE POSSESSION OF THE GUANTANAMO REVIEW TASK FORCE by BRICE GYURISKO, BARACK OBAMA, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO. (Henry, Terry) (Entered: 05/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT Concerning Production Of Information In The Possession Of The Guantanamo Review Task Force by ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK OBAMA. (Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 05/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE Of Filing Of Status Report Addressing Information Gathering Efforts Of Guantanamo Review Task Force by BARACK OBAMA, ROBERT M. GATES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 04/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE Of Respondents' Response To Order To Show Cause In Batarfi v. Gates, 05-CV-409 (EGS) by BARACK H. OBAMA, ROBERT M. GATES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 04/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE Regarding Order in Batarfi v. Gates, 05-CV-409 (EGS) by ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK OBAMA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 04/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE re (1705 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Joint MOTION to Continue Deadline For Filing Petitioners' Response to Government's Motion To Amend Protective Orders And Counsel Access Procedures filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES. (Berman, Julia) (Entered: 04/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION to Continue Deadline For Filing Petitioners' Response To Government's Motion To Amend Protective Orders And Counsel Access Procedures by OMAR KHADR, FATMAH ELSAMNAH, FALEN GHEREBI, BISHER NASER ALI ALMARWALH, HUISSEN NASER ALI ALMARWALH, MASAAB OMAR AL-MADHWANI, ALI OMAR MADHWANI, ABDULKHALIQ AL-BAIDHANI, KHALID AL-BAIDHANI, ALI AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, ABDULLAH AHMED MOHAMMED AL RAZEHI, SUHAIL ABDU ANAM, SAEED AHMED AL-SARIM, SAMIR AHMED AL-SARIM, IMAD ABDULLAH HASSAN, AMRO ABDULLAH HASSAN, JALAL SALIM BIN AMER, FAEZ BIN AMER, ALI YAHYA MAHDI, MOHAMED YAHYA MAHDI, ATAG ALI ABDOH, MOHAMED ABDU ANAM, KHALID AHMED KASSIM, FADHLE AHMED KASSIM, FAHMI ABDULLAH AHMED, KMAL ABDULLAH AHMED, ABDUALAZIZ ABDOH AL SWIDI, ADNAN ABDOH ALSWIDI, AL HUSSIN AL-TIS, HADI HUSSIN AL-TIS, FAHMI ABDULLAH UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, ALL PETITIONERS, ABDULLAH AHMED UBAD AL-TAWLAQI, MAHMOUD AHMED, ABDULMALIK ABDULWAHHAB AL-RAHABI, AHMED ABDULWAHHAB, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, FOADE YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, AREF ABD IL RHEEM, AREF ABD AL RAHIM, YASEIN KHASEM MOHAMMAD ESMAIL, JAMEL KHASEM MOHAMMAD, ADNAN FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, MAHMOAD ABDAH, MOHAMED FARHAN ABDUL LATIF, JAMAL MAR'I, NABIL MOHAMED MAR'I, OTHMAN ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ARAF ABDULRAHEEM MOHAMMAD, ADIL EL HAJ OBAID, NAZEM SAEED EL HAJ OBAID, MOHAMED MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, BASHIR MOHAMED HASSAN ODAINI, SADEQ MOHAMMED SAID, MAHMOAD ABDAH AHMED, ABD ALSALAM MOHAMMED SAEED, FAROUK ALI AHMED SAIF, SHEAB AL MOHAMEDI, SALMAN YAHALDI HSAN MOHAMMED SAUD, YAHIVA HSANE MOHAMMED SAUD AL-RBUAYE, MAJID MAHMOUD AHMED, IBRAHIM AHMED MAHMOUD AL QOSI, SAIFULLAH PARACHA, FARHAT PARACHA, ALI SALAH KAHLAH AL-MARRI, JARALLAH AL-MARRI, AHCENE ZEMIRI, KARINA DERESHTEANU, SHAKER ABDURRAHEEM AAMER, SAEED AHMED SIDDIQUE, OMAR DEGHAYES, TAHER DESGHAYES, JAMEL ABDULLAH KIYEMBA, THERESA NAMUDDU, MAHMOOD SALIM AL MOHAMMED, ABDULLA SALIM AL-MOHAMMED, FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, OMAR DEGHAYES, SHERIF EL-MASHAD, WAFFA EL-ARABIE, ADEL FATTOUH ALY AHMED ALGAZZAR, EAHME SALEM ALASSANI, SALEM SAED ALASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AGIL AL-NADHY, ZAHER OMER BEN HAMDON, MOHAMMED OMER KHAMIS HAMDON, MOHAMMED AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MUHAMMAD AL-ADAHI, MIRIAM ALI ABDULLAH AL-HAJ, MOHAMED ALI ABDULLA, MUHAMMAD ALI ABDULLAH BAWAZIR, SALIH ALI ABDULLAH BAWAZIR, FAHMI SALEM AL-ASSANI, SALEM SAID AL-ASSANI, SULEIMAN AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, GHAZI AWADH BIN AQIL AL-NAHDI, ZAHIR OMAR KHAMIS BIN HAMDOON, MUHAMMAD OMAR KHAMIS BIN HAMDOON, SALEH ALI ABDULLA BAWAZER, AHMED ABDULLAH AL-WAZAN, YOUNOUS CHEKKOURI, MOHAMMED ABDUL RAHMAN, RAFIQ BIN BASHIR BIN JALLUL ALHAMI, DJAMEL AMEZIANE, AHAMED ABDUL AZIZ, SABIHA AWAD HADRAMI, NASSER DAHER AL SHAMMARI, ABDUL RAHMAN SHALBY, SHAKER AAMER, ABDULLAH AALI AL OTIABI, MUHAMMED FAHAD AL QAHTANY, MUSA AL MADANY, SALEH ABDULLA AL-OSHAN, MOHAMMED SAAD MOHAMMED AL-OSHAN, ZABEN DHAHER AL SHAMMARI, MUHAMMED KHAN TUMANI, ABD AL NISR KHAN TUMANI, MOHAMMEDOU OULD SALAHI, YAHDIH OULD SALAHI, OMER SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHAMMED SAEED SALEM AL DAINI, MOHSEN ABDRUB ABOASSY, MOHAMMED SAEED BIN SALMAN, SAMEER NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, ABDULLA AHDRUB ABOASSY, SAEED SALIM BISALMAN, NAJY HASAN MUKBEL, ADEL HAMLILY, SHAKER AAMER, MOHAMMED AL NADOUR, MOHAMMED FAHREO, LAHCEN IKASRIEN, MOHAMMED MAZOZ, MOUSSA, ABDUL LATIF MOHAMMED NASSER, SAID, RIDOUANE SHAKUR, YOUNIS SHAKUR, TAREQ, OMAR DEGHAYES, AHMED ABU IMRAN, NAJEEB AL HUSSEINI, KHIALI-GUL, YASIN MUHAMMED BASARDH, ALI HUSSIAN MOHAMMAD MUETY SHAABAN, KARIN BOSTAN, MOHAMMAD MUSTAFA SOHAIL, ARKAN MOHAMMAD GHAFIL AL KARIM, ASIM BEN THABIT AL-KHALAQI, KASIMBEKOV KOMOLIDDIN TOHIRJANOVICH, ABDULSALAM ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, ABDULWAHAB ALI ABDULRAHMAN AL-HELA, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, HONORGOL KHIALIGOL, HAJI NUSRAT, ABDUL WAHID, HAJI ROHULLAH WAKIL, MOHAMMAD WAKIL, SABAR LAL, MOHAMMED HASSAN, WALI MOHAMMED MORAFA, HADAYA MORAFA, ABDUL RAHMAN AZIZ KHAN, ABD AL RAHMAN, ABDUL RAZAK IKTIAR MOHAMMED, ALI SHAH MOUSOVI, MOHAMMAD SAYYED SHAH, IZAATULLAH NUSRAT, OMAR MOHAMMED KHALIFH, OMAR DEGHAYES, TARIQ MAHMOUD ALSAWAM, ABU ABDUL RAUF ZALITA, OMAR DEGHAYES, FARHI SAEED BIN MOHAMMED, MOAZZAM BEGG, MOTAI SAIB, BISHER AL-RAWI, FATIMA NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, SAEED MOHAMMED SALEH HATIM, ALI MOHAMMED SALEH AL-SALAHI, MOHAMMED NASSER YAHIA ABDULLAH KHUSSROF, AHMED "DOE", OMAR DEGHAYES, JIHAD DHIAB, SHAKER AAMER, JAWAD JABBAR SADKHAN, HAMMAD DOE, HUDHAIFA DOE, JALAAL DOE, KHALID DOE, SAABIR DOE, SAADIQ DOE, JAMAL KIYEMBA, ABDUSABUR DOE, ABDUSAMAD DOE, ABDUNASIR DOE, ADIL BIN MUHAMMAD AL WIRGHI, MOAZZAM BEGG, TAWISS BINT HASAN AL WIRGHI, ABDL HADI OMAR MAHMOUD FARAJ, NABIL, JAMAAL KIYEMBA, SHAFIIQ, JAMAAL KIYEMBA, ABBAR SUFIAN AL HAWARY, SHAKER AAMER, BISHER AL-RAWI, IBRAHIM OSMAN IBRAHIM IDRIS, HASSAN BIN ATTASH, BENYAMIN MOHAMMED AL HABASHI, A'AMER SHAKER, HAMID AL RAZAK, BISHER AL RAWI, EDHAM MAMET, IBRAHIM MAMET, FOUZIA AHMMED, ABDUL RAHEEM GHULAM RABBANI, MALIKA, AHMMED GHULAM RABBANI, ABDUL ZAHIR, HUSSAIN SALEM MOHAMMED ALMERFEDI, SALEM MOHAMMED SALEM ABDULLA ALMERFEDI, WALEED SAEED BN SAEED ZAID, MOHAMMED SAEED BN SAEED ZAID, MOHAMMED RAJEB ABU GHANEM, HIMIGER SADER ABU GHANEM, AMEEN MOHAMMAD ALBKRI, ALI SALEH ALBKRI, ALLA ALI BIN ALI AHMED, WAGDI ALI BIN ALI, SADAR DOE, ARKEEN DOE, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, MOHAMMED AL-QAHTANI, MANEA AHMED FAHAD AL-QAHTANI, ISMAIL ALKHEMISI, HASAN BALGAID, OMAR DEGHAYES, RAVIL MINGAZA GAMIL, DILIARA MINGAZOVA, KHALED ABD ELGABAR MOHAMMED OTHMAN, ABD AL MALIK ABD AL WAHAB, MUHAMMED AHMED MUHAMMED ALGHURBANY, ALI HAMZA AHMED SULIMAN BAHLOOL, ABDOUL MOHAMMED AHMED BAHLOOL, SALEH MOHAMMED SELEH AL THABBII, FATMAH QHASIM AL AHMADI, ABDUL AL QADER AHMED HUSSAIN, ABDULGADER AHMED HASIN ABOBAKER, ISSAM HAMID ALI BIN ALI AL JAYFI, HAMID ALI AL JAYFI, OTHMAN ALI MOHAMMED AL SHAMRANY, ALI MOHAMED OMAR AL SHOMRANY, KHALID MOHAMMED AL THABBI, ABDU AL QADER HUSSAIN AL-MUDAFARI, SALIEH HUSSAIN ALI AL-MUDAFARI, HAYAL AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ALI AZIZ AHMED AL-MITHALI, ABD AL HAKIM GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, SAEED GHALIB AHMAD ALHAG, MOHAMMED ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, ALI ABDUL RAHMAN AL-SHIMRANI, AHMED BEN BACHA, BINYAM MOHAMMED, SALAH BELBACHA, TOORAN MOHAMMAD AMANNULLAH, MIRRA JAAN, MOHAMMAD WABI UMARI, GUL HYAT KHAN, ABDULLAH MUJAHID HAQ, FARID AHMED, MOHAMMAD RAHIM, MOHAMMAD KARIM, MOHAMMAD ZAHIR, ABDUL WAHAB, ABDULLAH WAZIR ZADRAN, GHULAM ROOHANI, GHULAM JEELANI, DR. HIYATULLAH, ABDUL ZAHIR, CHAMAN GUL KHIALIGOL, ZAHIR SHAH, ABDUL HAQ, ABDUL BARRI, AHMED AL DARBY, AHMAD MOHAMMAD AL DARBI, ALI MOHAMMAD AL DARBI, MOHAMMED MOHAMMED HASSEN, ABDUL HAMID ABDUL SALAM AL-GHIZZAWI, ALI YEHYA MAHDI AL-RIMI, ADHAM MOHAMMED ALI AWAD, ISMAIL ALI AL RAMMI, SOAID SALH AHMAD AL RAMMI, ADEL ALI AHMAD AL RAMMI, SAMI MUHYIDEEN, BANDAR AL JAABIR, JAMAL KIYEMBA, MOHAMMED ZAHRANI, OMAR DEGHAYES, SALIM SAID, ANWAR HANDAN AL SHIMMIRI, SULIMAN HONAHEEM ALOWAIDAH, SAAD AL QAHTAANI, JOBRAN SAAD AL-QUHTANI, NAWAL MADAY AL-QUHTANI, ZAKARIA AL-BAIDANY, ABDEL AZIZ AL-SWIDI, AHMED MOHAMMED HASSIN AL RAMMAH, MOHAMMED AL PALESTINI, OMAR (LNU), SOFAINE MOHAMMED BERHOUMI, ABDUL AZIZ NAJI, ABIN ALHAMED ABID ALSALLAM ALKESAWI, ABU RAWDA, UMAR ABDULLAH AL KUNDUZI, KHALED ABDALLAH AL-IDAN, ABDUL RAUF ASIBI, ABDUL RAZAK ALI, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH TAHA MATTAN, MAHER LNU, MUSTAFA AL SHAMILI, SHARGOWI LNU, BISHER AL-RAWI, OYBEK JAMOLDINIVICH JABBAROV, SANAD ALI ALKALIEMI, FADL DAHIMI, ABDUL SALAM DEIFF, ABDURAHMAN LNU, AHMED OMAR, ALI LNU, EDRESS LNU, MOHAMMED AHMED SAEED HIDAR, SAIF ULLAH, SAMIR LNU, YOYEJ, SAEED, OMAR DOE, SHARAF AL SANANI, OMAR DEGHAYES, FAHD ABU HAFSA, JAMAL KIYEMBA, ABDUL HAQ, NADIR OMAR ADULLAH BIN SAADOUN ALSAARY, SAMI MUHYIDEEN, OMAR RAMAH, ABD AL ZAHER, FAWZI KHALED ABDALLAH AL-AUDHA, ABDULLAH BO OMER HAMZA YOYEJ, ABU RAHAN, NAJEEB DOE, SAD AL GAHTANI, AMER MOHAMMON, FAHD AL HARAAZI, JABIR AL QUATANY, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, MOHSEN, FAHD AL FAWZAN, ADEL LNU, RASHED AL QAMDI, BANDAR AL SHAIBANI, ALI SHER HAMIDULLAH, MARSHAL DOE, KHALD AL BARKATI, ABDULAL AL THANI, ABU AHMED AL JOFI, SLAIM HARBI, ABU RAD AL JOFI, MUHAMMED HARBI, ABDULAZIZ LNU, ABDULAL DOE, SAD AL MATERI, BOUCETTA FIHI, SAYF BIN ABDALLAH, SEED FARHA, SALEH DOE, AHMED ADNAN AHJAM, MAGED DOE, ZEYAD AL GASSMY, ADEL HASSAN, HAMAD DOE, JAMIL AHMAD SAEED, HALA AHMAD SAEED AL-ADAHG, AMIR DOE, ALKHADR ABDULLAH AL YAFIE, TOFIQ NASSER AWAD AL BIHANI, ABU AHMED, WALEED DOE, WALEED LNU, SAMIR DOE, ELHAM BATAIF, ZEIN AL-ABEDEEN, YAGOOB AL SOURY, ABDUL RHMAN, ADEL AL TUNISI, ZAKER CHAN, SADER DOE, MOHAMMED AHMED SLAM AL-KHATEEB, ALI AL KAZMI, ADNAN AL BIHANI, ALI YAHYA MAHDI, ABDULLAH LNU, ABDURAZZAK LNU, KHADER DOE, BILAL LNU, MOSHEN DOE, ABDUL RAHMAN, ABDURRAZAKH LNU, FAHD DOE, JAMIL EL-BANNA, ADEL LNU, OSAMA DOE, MOHAMED HMADI, ABDUL-RAHMAN ABDO ABULGHAITH SULAIMAN, FAHMI DOE, ESAM DOE, TALAH AHMED MOHAMMED ALI ALMJRD, AHMED MOHAMMED ALI ALMJRD, USAMA HASAN ABU KABIR, ABDUR RAZAKAH, AHMAD DOE, ALI KADAMI, AYMAN, FAWAZ, HOUMAD WARZLY, MOHAMED RAJAB, OTHMAN ALI MUHAMMED OMAR, MOHAMMED KAMEEN, SABRY MOHAMMED, SALEH, WAQAS MOHAMMED ALI AWAD, ZAKARIA, KHALID MOHAMMED, MUHAMMAD NUR UTHMAN MUHAMMAD, MAHDI SALIH, SAKI BACHA, SHAMSULLAH, ABOU YASSIR JEZAIRI, ABDAL RAUF ZALITINI, ABDAUL RAZAK ALI-HAJ, ADNAN, AHAMED, SALAH DEEN IBN SHAIKH, SALIH, SALEH LIBI, ABD AL RAHMAN ABDULLAH AL HALMANDY, MUHAMMED SAAD IQBAL MADNI, SAID MADANY, ABDULLAH JAFFA, ABU HADIFA, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH, SANJAWEZ RAWEEL KAMEEL WEEJ, ABUL AZIZ AL MATRAFI, MAJED BARYAN, MOHAMED FAHAD SAAD AL ZU'BI, MOUSSA, ABDULRAHMAN, SAUD AL JOUHANY, SULTAN AL SHAREEF, ABDU TAWAB, ABDUL AZIZ, ABU RAWDAH, ABDUL AL HAMMAN, ABDUL LATIF, ABDULLA HAJI, ABDULLA, ADEL, INSHANULLAH, BITAL ADEL HALAMI, HISHAM, RAFIOVE BIN BASHIR, RIAD NARGERI, RIDAH, SAIF, MASOUD, ABDULLAH, ABDULLAH ALI SALEH, AMAR BILOUSHI, KHALID DESHIRE, IBRAHIM NAYIF ADBALLAH IBRAHIM, MOHAMMED CHINGUITY, ABDO ALI AL HAJ, ABU BAKER SHAMMRANY, GHANIM-ABDULRAHMAN AL-HARBI, RAVIL MINGAZOV, ZAINULABIDIN MEROZHEV, ELHAM BATTAYAV, ABDULLI FEGHOUL, ALI ABDULLAH ALI, MOHAMMED AHMED TAHER, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH MOHAMMED BA ODAH, TARIQ ALI ABDULLAH BA ODAH, NASSER ALI ABDULLAH BA ODAH, MOHAMED AL-ZARNOUQI, MASHOUR ABDULLAH MUQBEL ALSABRI, MAJID KHAN, RABIA KHAN, FAIZ AHMED YAHIA SULIMAN, HADDAD AHMED YAHIA SULIMAN, MOHAMED MUQBEL AHMED ALSABRI, MOHAMED AL-ZARNOUQI, MASHOUR ABDULLAH MUQBEL ALSABRI, ELISHER, SABIR, FADHEL HUSSEIN SALEH HENTIF, HAYKAL MOHAMMED SALEH HENTIF, ACHRAF SALIM ABDESSALAM, IYOB MURSHAD ALI SALEH, MURSHAD ALI SALEH, ABDULRAHMAN MUHAMMAD SALEH NASSER, MUHAMMAD MUHAMMAD SALEH NASSER, RIDAH BIN SALEH AL YAZIDI, SAMI AL HAJJ, ABDURRAHMAN ABDALLAH ALI MAHMOUD AL SHUBATI, ABDULLAH ALI MAHMOUD AL SHUBATI, MOAMMAR BADAWI DOKHAN, SAMI AL HAJJ, ABDUL RAHIM HUSSEIN MUHAMMED ALI NASHIR, SCOTT L. FENSTERMAKER, BASHIR GHALAAB, SHAWALI KHAN, MOHAMMED SULAYMON BARRE, MOHAMMED ABD AL AL QADIR, ABD AL-RAHIM HUSSAIN MOHAMMED AL-NASHIRI, AWAL GUL, HAMOUD ABDULLAH HAMOUD HASSAN AL WADY, SALEM AHMED HADI, MAHMMOUD OMAR MOHAMMED BIN ATEF, KAHLID SAAD MOHAMMED, MAHBUB RAHMAN, MOHAMMAD RAHMAN, SAMI AL HAJJ, MONSOOR MUHAMMED ALI QATTAA, SHAKHRUKH HAMIDUVA, ADINA HAMIDOVA, FNU HAFIZULLAH, MUIEEN ADEEN JAMAL ADEEN ABD AL F. ABD AL SATTAR, SHAWKI AWAD BALZUHAIR, YAKUBI, AHMED YASLAM SAID KUMAN, ABDULAH ALHAMIRI, ABDUL GHAFFAR, ADEL NOORI, ZAYN AL ABIDIN MUHAMMAD HUSAYN, MOHAMMED ABDULMALIK, SALIM JUMA KHAMISI, HASSAN ABDUL SAID, SAMI AL HAJJ, KHAIRULLA KHAIRKHWA, SAMI AL HAJJ, MULLAH NORULLAH NOORI, SAMI AL HAJJ, MUHAMMAD AHMAD ABDALLAH AL ANSI, SAMI AL HAJJ, ABDUL RAHMAN UMIR AL QYATI, SAAD MASIR MUKBL AL AZANI, AMMAR AL-BALUCHI, MOHAMMED NAZIR BIN LEP, MANSOUR K. A. KAMEL, ABDULAZIZ SAYER OWAIN AL SHAMMARI, SAYER O. Z. AL SHAMMARI, ABDULLAH SALEH ALI AL AJMI, MESFER SALEH ALI AL AJMI, MOHAMMED FUNAITEL AL DIHANI, MUBARA F. S. M. AL DAIHANI, FAYIZ MOHAMMED AHMED AL KANDARI, MOHAMMAD A. J. M. H. AL KANDARI, FWAD MAHMOUD AL RABIAH, MONZER M. H. A. AL RABIEAH, ADIL ZAMIL ABDULL MOHSSIN AL ZAMIL, WALID Z. A. AL ZAMEL, FAWZI KHALID ABDULLAH FAHAD AL ODAH, KHALED A.F. AL ODAH, NASSER NIJER NASER AL MUTAIRI, ABDULLAH KAMAL ABDULLAH KAMAL AL KANDARI, SAAD MADAI SAAD HAWASH AL-AZMI, HAMAD MADAI SAAD, OMAR RAJAB AMIN, MOHAMMAD R.M.R. AMEEN, NAYEF N. N. B. J. AL MUTAIRI, KHALID ABDULLAH MISHAL AL MUTAIRI, MESHAL A. M. TH AL MUTAIRI (Thompson, Darin) (Entered: 03/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/18/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER regarding hearing on March 26, 2009. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 3/18/09. (lctfh1) (Entered: 03/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM by JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, BARACK H. OBAMA, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, COMMANDER OF THE JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER OF PRISON CAMP, GTMO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, RICHARD B. CHENEY, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, ROBERT GATES, DAVID THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, TERRY CARRICO. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Decl. of Att'y General Eric H. Holder, Jr.)(Hardee, Norman) (Entered: 03/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing of Classified Declaration Ex Parte and In Camera by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES (Berman, Julia) (Entered: 03/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/11/2009, Entered: None Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Amend/Correct September 11, 2008 Protective Order and Counsel Access Procedures and January 9, 2009 Amended TS/SCI Protective Order and Counsel Access Procedures by ROBERT GATES, GEORGE W. BUSH (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(Berman, Julia) (Entered: 03/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ERRATA declaration of Scott L. Fenstermaker, Esq. correcting factual misstatement contained in document 35 by AMMAR AL-BALUCHI 27 First MOTION for Leave to File Letter from Petitioner to Counsel Under Seal for the Court's in camera and ex parte consideration filed by AMMAR AL-BALUCHI. (Fenstermaker, Scott) (Entered: 03/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to opposition to motion re 27 First MOTION for Leave to File Letter from Petitioner to Counsel Under Seal for the Court's in camera and ex parte consideration filed by AMMAR AL-BALUCHI. (Fenstermaker, Scott) (Entered: 03/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OPINION declining to consolidate petitions in 08-mc-0442 and recommending reassignment of fifteen petitions. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 2/27/09. (lctfh1) (Entered: 03/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in opposition to re (1624 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) First MOTION for Leave to File letter from Petitioner to Counsel under seal for the Court's in camera and ex parte consideration, (27 in 1:08-cv-02083-PLF) First MOTION for Leave to File Letter from Petitioner to Counsel Under Seal for the Court's in camera and ex parte consideration filed by ROBERT M. GATES, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 03/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ERRATA Respondents Status Report and Motion for Extension of Time to File Factual Returns and Legal Justification, (also filed as Dkt. No. 1656 in Misc. No. 08-442) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO (72 in 1:08-cv-01221-CKK, 30 in 1:08-cv-02083-PLF, 101 in 1:06-cv-01766-HHK, 147 in 1:06-cv-01690-RBW, 101 in 1:08-cv-01207-RWR, 1043 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW, 52 in 1:08-cv-01440-CKK, 85 in 1:04-cv-01937-PLF, 122 in 1:05-cv-02371-RCL, 1655 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 206 in 1:05-cv-02385-RMU, 45 in 1:08-cv-01789-RWR) MOTION for Extension of Time to filed by MICHAEL BUMGARNER, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, RICHARD B. CHENEY, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, BRUCE VARGO, MIKE BUMGARNER, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR., GEORGE TENET, DAVID M. THOMAS, DONALD RUMSFELD, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, GEORGE W. BUSH, WADE F. DAVIS, ROBERT GATES, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR., COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR., ROBERT M. GATES, GORDON R. ENGLAND, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, CONDELEEZA RICE. (Berman, Julia) (Entered: 02/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT (also filed as dkt. no. 1655 in No. 08-mc-0442) by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Alternative Proposed Order)(Berman, Julia) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Factual Returns and Legal Justification by DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, BARACK OBAMA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Alternative Proposed Order)(Berman, Julia) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT re 27 First MOTION for Leave to File Letter from Petitioner to Counsel Under Seal for the Court's in camera and ex parte consideration, 28 Memorandum Supplemental Declaration in Support of Motion to File Document Under Seal and in Response to the Court's December 15, 2008, December 26, 2008, and December 29, 2008 orders by AMMAR AL-BALUCHI. (Fenstermaker, Scott) (Entered: 02/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM re Order,,, Order, by AMMAR AL-BALUCHI. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration in Support of Memorandum)(Fenstermaker, Scott) (Entered: 02/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  First MOTION for Leave to File Letter from Petitioner to Counsel Under Seal for the Court's in camera and ex parte consideration by AMMAR AL-BALUCHI (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration in Support of Motion for an Order Directing Petitioner to file a document under seal, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Fenstermaker, Scott) (Entered: 02/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to opposition to motion re 21 First MOTION for Reconsideration of This Court's January 22, 2009 Sua Sponte Denial of Petitioner's January 13, 2009 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by AMMAR AL-BALUCHI. (Fenstermaker, Scott) (Entered: 02/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in opposition to re (1542 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) First MOTION for Reconsideration of This Court's January 22, 2009 sua sponte order denying Petitioner's January 13, 2009 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief without prejudice, (21 in 1:08-cv-02083-PLF) First MOTION for Reconsideration of This Court's January 22, 2009 Sua Sponte Denial of Petitioner's January 13, 2009 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by ROBERT M. GATES, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 02/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Ex Parte Filing Under Seal of Errata Concerning Respondents' January 22, 2009 Ex Parte Filing Under Seal by JAY HOOD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, BARACK H. OBAMA, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Davis, Patrick) (Entered: 02/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ERRATA -- Corrections to Respondents' Exhibits to their January 21, 2009 Filing by JAY HOOD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, BARACK H. OBAMA, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, GEORGE TENET, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Davis, Patrick) (Entered: 02/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in opposition to re (88 in 1:05-cv-01623-RWR, 158 in 1:05-cv-02385-RMU, 17 in 1:08-cv-01828-RMU, 171 in 1:05-cv-02378-JDB, 131 in 1:05-cv-02380-CKK, 245 in 1:05-cv-00280-GK, 144 in 1:05-cv-02185-JR, 130 in 1:05-cv-00526-RMU, 66 in 1:08-cv-01238-RWR, 52 in 1:08-cv-01232-JR, 174 in 1:05-cv-01124-RMC, 117 in 1:05-cv-02199-HHK, 135 in 1:05-cv-02104-RBW, 194 in 1:05-cv-02384-RWR, 192 in 1:05-cv-00520-RMU, 442 in 1:02-cv-00828-CKK, 152 in 1:05-cv-01555-JR, 64 in 1:08-cv-01236-JDB, 346 in 1:04-cv-01194-HHK, 87 in 1:06-cv-01668-HHK, 139 in 1:05-cv-01607-RMU, 110 in 1:05-cv-01244-CKK, 57 in 1:08-cv-01104-CKK, 109 in 1:05-cv-00889-ESH, 403 in 1:04-cv-01254-HHK, 159 in 1:05-cv-00329-PLF, 87 in 1:06-cv-01758-RMC, 121 in 1:05-cv-01497-RCL, 140 in 1:05-cv-01487-RMC, 115 in 1:05-cv-00883-RBW, 175 in 1:04-cv-01164-RBW, 123 in 1:05-cv-00764-CKK-AK, 109 in 1:05-cv-01971-RMC, 88 in 1:07-cv-02338-HHK, 123 in 1:05-cv-01983-RMU, 131 in 1:05-cv-01347-GK, 145 in 1:05-cv-01504-RMC, 131 in 1:05-cv-00763-JDB, 55 in 1:08-cv-01224-RMC, 146 in 1:05-cv-00392-ESH, 145 in 1:05-cv-01490-PLF, 133 in 1:04-cv-02046-CKK, 204 in 1:05-cv-02367-RWR, 154 in 1:05-cv-01592-RCL, 110 in 1:05-cv-00877-JR, 167 in 1:05-cv-01601-GK, 71 in 1:08-cv-00987-JDB, 69 in 1:08-cv-01101-JDB, 124 in 1:05-cv-00748-RMC, 42 in 1:08-cv-01805-RMU, 93 in 1:06-cv-01761-ESH, 31 in 1:08-cv-01789-RWR, 85 in 1:05-cv-02387-RMC, 123 in 1:05-cv-00634-RWR, 99 in 1:05-cv-00998-RMU, 144 in 1:05-cv-00247-HHK, 118 in 1:05-cv-00892-CKK, 141 in 1:05-cv-02186-ESH, 135 in 1:05-cv-01638-CKK, 70 in 1:08-cv-01235-JDB, 104 in 1:05-cv-01645-PLF, 39 in 1:08-cv-01440-CKK, 170 in 1:05-cv-01220-RMU, 88 in 1:05-cv-01189-JR, 177 in 1:05-cv-00270-JR, 111 in 1:06-cv-01684-GK, 119 in 1:06-cv-01767-RMU, 192 in 1:05-cv-00023-RWR, 80 in 1:07-cv-01710-RBW, 72 in 1:08-cv-01153-HHK, 26 in 1:08-cv-02019-RBW, 123 in 1:06-cv-01690-RBW, 1526 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 53 in 1:08-cv-01228-RMC, 128 in 1:05-cv-01678-GK, 51 in 1:08-cv-01221-CKK, 114 in 1:05-cv-00993-RMU, 70 in 1:08-cv-01233-ESH, 166 in 1:05-cv-01353-RMC, 905 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW, 146 in 1:05-cv-00492-JR, 236 in 1:04-cv-02022-PLF, 122 in 1:05-cv-02379-JR, 90 in 1:08-cv-01360-RWR, 29 in 1:08-cv-01923-GK, 101 in 1:05-cv-01457-GK, 145 in 1:05-cv-02249-RMC, 149 in 1:05-cv-00359-GK, 132 in 1:05-cv-01506-RMC, 198 in 1:05-cv-01429-RMU, 165 in 1:05-cv-02479-HHK, 121 in 1:05-cv-01646-JDB) MOTION to Intervene for the Limited Purpose of Opposing Government's Motion to Confirm Designation of Unclassified Factual Returns as "Protected" filed by JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, B. OBAMA, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. (Berman, Julia) (Entered: 01/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              First MOTION for Reconsideration of This Court's January 22, 2009 Sua Sponte Denial of Petitioner's January 13, 2009 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by AMMAR AL-BALUCHI (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Reconsideration of Sua Sponte Denial of Motion for Miscellaneous Relief)(Fenstermaker, Scott) (Entered: 01/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Ex Parte Filing Under Seal of Detainee Information Pursuant to the Court's January 14, 2009 Order by JAY HOOD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, YOUNOUS CHEKKOURI, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, B. OBAMA, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, GEORGE TENET, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Davis, Patrick) (Entered: 01/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to JAY HOOD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, B. OBAMA, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, BARACK OBAMA, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO. Attorney Scott Michael Marconda terminated. (Marconda, Scott) (Entered: 01/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing of Detainee Information Pursuant to the Court's January 14, 2009 Order by JAY HOOD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, YOUNOUS CHEKKOURI, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Davis, Patrick) (Entered: 01/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick D. Davis on behalf of JAY HOOD, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GORDON R. ENGLAND, JOHN D. ALTENBURG, JR, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, JAY HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, NELSON J. CANNON, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, J. HOOD, NELSON J. CANNON, JAY HOOD, BRICE A. GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, NELSON J. CANNON, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BRICE GYURISKO, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, MIKE BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, DONALD RUMSFELD, BRICE GYURISKO, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MICHAEL BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, MIKE BUMGARNER, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, MIKE BUMGARNER, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, DONALD RUMSFELD, WADE F. DAVIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, JOHN DOE, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CONDELEEZA RICE, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, GEORGE TENET, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, BRUCE VARGO, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT M. GATES, MARK H. BUZBY, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, BRUCE VARGO, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD H. RUMSFELD, RICHARD B. MYERS, RICK BACCUS, TERRY CARRICO (Davis, Patrick) (Entered: 01/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER directing the government to provide the Court with additional information. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 1/14/09. (lctfh1) (Entered: 01/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT re 14 Notice of Proposed Order, 13 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by AMMAR AL-BALUCHI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit I - Declaration, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit I - Motion, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit O)(Fenstermaker, Scott) (Entered: 01/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Proposed Order by AMMAR AL-BALUCHI (Fenstermaker, Scott) (Entered: 01/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by AMMAR AL-BALUCHI (Fenstermaker, Scott) (Entered: 01/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER amending the Protective Order for Habeas Cases Involving TOP SECRET/SENSITIVE COMPARTMENTED INFORMATION and Procedures for Counsel Access to Detainees at the United States Naval Base in Guantanamo Bay, Cuba, in Habeas Cases Involving TOP SECRET/SENSITIVE COMPARTMENTED INFORMATION entered on January 7, 2009, and Amended Protective Order for Habeas Cases Involving TOP SECRET/SENSITIVE COMPARTMENTED INFORMATION and Procedures for Counsel Access to Detainees at the United States Naval Base in Guantanamo Bay, Cuba, in Habeas Cases Involving TOP SECRET/SENSITIVE COMPARTMENTED INFORMATION (attached as Exhibit 1). Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 1/9/09. (lctfh1) (Entered: 01/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/7/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR HABEAS CASES INVOLVING TOP SECRET/SENSITIVE COMPARTMENTED INFORMATION AND PROCEDURES FOR COUNSEL ACCESS TO DETAINEES AT THE UNITED STATES NAVAL BASE IN GUANTANAMO BAY, CUBA, IN HABEAS CASES INVOLVING TOP SECRET/SENSITIVE COMPARTMENTED INFORMATION. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 1/7/09. (lctfh1) (Entered: 01/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Terry Marcus Henry on behalf of ROBERT M. GATES, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO (Henry, Terry) (Entered: 01/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ERRATA by GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR (1431 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with Case Management Orders Requiring Exculpatory Disclosures/Certifications filed by GUANTANAMO BAY DETAINEE LITIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (corrected))(Needle, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with Case Management Orders Requiring Exculpatory Disclosures/Certifications by ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, GEORGE W. BUSH (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Needle, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT in Response to Court's December 15, 2008 Order by ROBERT M. GATES, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO. (Needle, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan S. Needle on behalf of ROBERT M. GATES, COMMANDER, JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, COMMANDER, PRISON CAMP, GTMO (Needle, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT Petitioner's December 21, 2008 status report by AMMAR AL-BALUCHI. (Fenstermaker, Scott) (Entered: 12/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/19/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER that, in the interest of facilitating Judge Hogan's case-coordination process, the Court will transfer this case to Judge Hogan for coordination and management as reflected in the July 1, 2008 Resolution of the Executive Session. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on December 19, 2008. (MA) (Entered: 12/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER requiring joint filing regarding consolidation by January 5, 2009. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 12/17/08. (lctfh1) (Entered: 12/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by AMMAR AL-BALUCHI (jf, ) (Entered: 12/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 0.00.) filed by AMMAR AL-BALUCHI. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jf, ) (Entered: 12/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 251 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?