MOHAMMED ABDULLAH TAHA MATTAN, ET AL. V. BARACK H. OBAMA, ET AL.
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:09-cv-00745-RCL

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 18, 2021 at 4:44 PM EDT (6.5 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo ABDUL RAZAK ALI, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Albert Einstein Institution

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space H. Candace Gorman +1 312 427 2313 +1 312 427 9552 hcgorman@igc.org
No Logo ABDURAHMAN LNU, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by FEDERAL DEFENDERS OF THE MD GA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amy B. Cleary +1 216 522 4856 +1 216 522 4321 amy_cleary@fd.org
Space Jillian S. Davis +1 216 522 4856 jillian_davis@fd.org
Space Darin Thompson +1 216 522 4856 +1 216 522 4321 darin_thompson@fd.org
Space Carlos Warner +1 216 522 4856 +1 216 522 4321 carlos_warner@fd.org
Space Vicki Werneke +1 216 522 4856 +1 216 522 1951 vicki_werneke@fd.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Defender Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andy P. Hart +1 419 259 7370 +1 419 259 7375 andy_hart@fd.org
Space Timothy C. Ivey +1 216 522 4856 +1 216 522 4321 timothy_ivey@fd.org
Space Jonathan P. Witmer-Rich +1 216 522 4856 +1 216 522 4321 jonathan_witmer-rich@fd.org
No Logo ABU RAWDA, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by 1001 Fourth Avenue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David S. Marshall +1 206 826 1400 +1 206 389 1708 dmarshall@davidsmarshall.com
No Logo AHMED ADNAN AHJAM, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Bull Run Hall

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David H. Remes +1 202 669 6508 remesdh@gmail.com
No Logo EDRESS LNU, Petitioner
No Logo MOHAMMED ABDULLAH TAHA MATTAN, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Board Of Trustees Of The Leland Stanford Junior University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barbara J. Olshansky +1 650 736 2312 +1 650 725 8509 bolshansky@law.stanford.edu

Toggle Switch Represented by Hangley, Aronchick, Segal & Pudlin, Esqs.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM T. HANGLEY +1 215 496 7001 +1 215 568 0300 whangley@hangley.com
Space Rebecca Y. Starr +1 215 568 6200 rstarr@hangley.com
Space SOZI PEDRO TULANTE +1 215 496 7073 +1 215 568 0300 stulante@hangley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lansner & Kubitschek

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shayana Devendra Kadidal +1 212 614 6438 +1 212 614 6499 kadidal@ccrjustice.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Schnader Harrison Segal & Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gordon Samuel Woodward +1 202 419 4215 +1 202 419 4253 gwoodward@schnader.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Western New England College

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lauren Carasik +1 413 782 1504 lcarasik@law.wnec.edu
No Logo MOHAMMED AHMED SLAM AL-KHATEEB, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Alston & Bird, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan M. Fee +1 202 756 3300 +1 202 756 4987 jon.fee@alston.com
Space Kristin Ann Meister +1 212 210 9464
Space W. Terence Walsh +1 404 881 7161 +1 404 881 7777 terry.walsh@alston.com
Space Michael E. Ward +1 202 756 3076 michael.ward@alston.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin Lee Snowden +1 202 824 1423 +1 202 403 3815 bsnowden@kilpatricktownsend.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Patton Boggs LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jill M. Williamson +1 202 457 6512 +1 202 457 6315 jwilliamson@pattonboggs.com
No Logo NADIR OMAR ABDULLAH BIN SA'ADO ALS'AARY, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Bull Run Hall

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ahmed Ghappour +1 114 420 7353 +01144 207 353 4641 aghappour@gmail.com
Space Zachary Katznelson +1 718 340 4558 zkatznelson@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by FEDERAL DEFENDERS OF THE MD GA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donna M. Grill +1 419 259 7370 +1 419 259 7375 donna_grill@fd.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Defender Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward G. Bryan +1 216 522 4856 +1 216 522 4321 edward_bryan@fd.org
No Logo SHARGOWI LNU, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Bull Run Hall

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sara Jane Toering +1 404 853 8000 +1 404 853 8806 Sara.Toering@sablaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by KING & SPALDING (GA)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Letzring +1 404 572 2707 jletzring@kslaw.com
Space Ilyse B. Stempler +1 202 626 2938 istempler@kslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David M Barnes +1 404 572 4619 dbarnes@kslaw.com
Space John A. Chandler +1 404 572 4600 jchandler@kslaw.com
Space Patricia L Maher +1 202 626 5504 +1 202 626 3737 pmaher@kslaw.com
Space Diana J. Pomeranz +1 202 737 0500 +1 202 626 3737 dpomeranz@kslaw.com
Space PHV Elizabeth V. Tanis +1 404 572 4660 +1 404 572 5100 etanis@kslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sutherland Asbill & Brennan LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John P. Anderson +1 202 383 0454 +1 202 637 3593 john.anderson@sablaw.com
Space Richard G. Murphy, Jr. +1 202 383 0635 +1 202 637 3593 rick.murphy@sutherland.com
Space Brian C. Spahn +1 202 383 0832 +1 202 637 3593 brian.spahn@sablaw.com
Space Kristin B. Wilhelm +1 404 853 8542 +1 404 853 8809 kristin.wilhelm@sablaw.com
No Logo SHARQAWI ABDU ALI-AL HAAG, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by King & Spalding LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John A. Chandler +1 404 572 4600 jchandler@kslaw.com
Space Diana J. Pomeranz +1 202 737 0500 +1 202 626 3737 dpomeranz@kslaw.com
Space Ilyse B. Stempler +1 202 626 2938 istempler@kslaw.com
v.
Obama, Barack Hussein Obama, Barack Hussein, Respondent
Officially listed as "BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II"
United States of America President, United States of America, January 20, 2009 - January 20, 2017

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas A. Gillice +1 202 305 9928 +1 202 616 8470 thomas.gillice@usdoj.gov
Space Olivia R. Hussey Scott +1 202 616 1972 +1 202 514 6770 olivia.hussey.scott@usdoj.gov
Space Eric J. Soskin +1 202 353 0533 eric.soskin@usdoj.gov
No Logo DONALD RUMSFELD, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Hunter Bennett +1 202 616 2279 +1 202 307 0972 j.hunter.bennett@usdoj.gov
Bush, George Walker Bush, George Walker, Respondent
Officially listed as "GEORGE WALKER BUSH"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert J. Branman +1 202 305 9410 +1 202 305 2685 robert.branman@usdoj.gov
Space David Farnham +1 202 305 4693 david.farnham2@usdoj.gov
No Logo JAY HOOD, Respondent
No Logo MIKE BUMGARNER, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by McElroy Deutsch Mulvaney & Carpenter, LLP-Greenwood Village

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Ross Smart +1 203 319 4039 +1 203 259 0251 jsmart@mdmc-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charlotte A. Abel +1 202 307 2332 +1 202 514 8780 charlotte.abel@usdoj.gov
Space Paul Edward Ahern +1 202 305 0633 +1 202 616 8470 Paul.Ahern@usdoj.gov
Space Brent I. Anderson +1 202 305 8744 +1 202 305 2685 brent.anderson2@usdoj.gov
Space Timothy Allen Bass +1 202 305 7527 +1 202 616 8470 timothy.bass2@usdoj.gov
Space Scott R. Belhorn ust35 +1 202 305 8782 +1 216 522 7193 Scott.R.Belhorn@usdoj.gov
Space Julia A. Berman +1 202 616 8480 +1 202 307 0442 julia.berman@usdoj.gov
Space Blanche L. Bruce +1 202 307 6078 blanche.bruce@usdoj.gov
Space Mary Elizabeth Carney +1 202 305 4281 mary.carney2@usdoj.gov
Space James Edward Cox, Jr. +1 202 305 8629 +1 503 727 1117 jim.cox2@usdoj.gov
Space Kathryn Celia Davis +1 202 616 8298 +1 202 616 8470 Kathryn.C.Davis@usdoj.gov
Space Patrick D. Davis +1 202 305 0879 +1 202 616 8470 patrick.davis2@usdoj.gov
Space Paul Anthony Dean +1 202 514 1280 +1 202 616 8470 paul.dean@usdoj.gov
Space Stephen McCoy Elliott +1 202 305 8177 stephen.elliott@usdoj.gov
Space Joseph Charles Folio, III +1 202 305 4968 +1 202 616 8470 joseph.folio@usdoj.gov
Space James J. Gilligan +1 202 514 3358 +1 202 616 8470 james.gilligan@usdoj.gov
Space Alexander Kenneth Haas +1 202 307 3937 +1 202 616 8470 alexander.haas@usdoj.gov
Space Norman Christopher Hardee +1 202 305 7498 +1 202 616 8460 Christopher.Hardee2@usdoj.gov
Space John K. Henebery +1 202 514 9472 john.henebery@usdoj.gov
Space Terry Marcus Henry +1 202 514 4107 +1 202 616 8470 terry.henry@usdoj.gov
Space Dalin Riley Holyoak +1 202 305 8491 dalin.holyoak@usdoj.gov
Space Wynne Patrick Kelly +1 202 305 9343 +1 202 514 8780 wynne.p.kelly@usdoj.gov
Space Michael Thomas Koenig +1 202 616 0495 michael.koenig@usdoj.gov
Space Jeffrey Paul LaVicka +1 501 340 2613 jeff.lavicka@usdoj.gov
Space Scott Douglas Levin +1 202 616 9193 +1 202 305 2685 Scott.Levin@usdoj.gov
Space Jean Lin +1 202 514 3716 +1 202 616 8470 jean.lin@usdoj.gov
Space John P. Lohrer +1 202 616 5125 +1 202 307 5802 john.lohrer@usdoj.gov
Space James C. Luh +1 202 514 4938 james.luh@usdoj.gov
Space Sarah Maloney +1 202 616 1436 sarah.maloney2@usdoj.gov
Space Scott Michael Marconda +1 202 305 0169 scott.marconda@usdoj.gov
Space Carolyn Gail Mark +1 202 307 0256 carolyn.mark@usdoj.gov
Space Trish Maskew +1 202 305 7658 trish.maskew@usdoj.gov
Space Steve Ray Matheny +1 202 305 9284 +8564 856 856 4821 steve.matheny2@usdoj.gov
Space Kristofer Ryan McDonald +1 202 305 4087 kristofer.r.mcdonald@usdoj.gov
Space Nicole Newcomb Murley +1 202 616 0473 +1 202 616 4950 nicole.murley@usdoj.gov
Space Preeya M. Noronha +1 202 514 3338 +1 202 616 8202 preeya.noronha@usdoj.gov
Space Sean W. O'Donnell, Jr. +1 202 305 4880 sean.o'donnell@usdoj.gov
Space Nicholas Andrew Oldham +1 202 514 3367 +1 202 616 8470 Nicholas.Oldham@usdoj.gov
Space Robert J. Prince +1 202 305 3654 robert.prince@usdoj.gov
Space Nancy Naseem Safavi +1 202 305 3306 +1 202 305 2685 nancy.safavi@usdoj.gov
Space James J. Schwartz +1 202 616 8267 +1 202 616 8202 james.schwartz@usdoj.gov
Space Martin Morris Shoemaker +1 202 514 6491 +1 202 514 6770 martin.m.shoemaker@usdoj.gov
Space Keith Simmons +1 202 305 9203 keith.simmons2@usdoj.gov
Space Corey Justin Smith +1 202 305 3395 +1 202 305 2685 corey.j.smith2@usdoj.gov
Space Sherry Denise Soanes +1 202 532 4108 +1 202 305 7000 sherry.soanes@usdoj.gov
Space Andrew Louis Sparks +1 859 685 4831 +1 859 233 2533 Andrew.Sparks@usdoj.gov
Space David J. Stander +1 240 643 2723 david.stander@usdoj.gov
Space Flor M. Suarez +1 202 305 1062 +1 202 305 7000 flor.suarez@usdoj.gov
Space Judry Laeb Subar +1 202 514 3969 +1 202 616 8470 judry.subar@usdoj.gov
Space John Edward Wallace +1 202 305 9909 john.wallace2@usdoj.gov
Space Andrew Irwin Warden +1 202 616 5084 +1 202 616 8460 andrew.warden@usdoj.gov
Space Jane L. Westby +1 520 620 7300 +1 520 620 7149 jane.westby2@usdoj.gov
Space David Hugh White +1 202 514 3146 +1 202 616 8470 david.white2@usdoj.gov
Space Rachelle C. Williams +1 202 305 8782 +1 202 307 2185 rachelle.c.williams@usdoj.gov
Space Kristina Ann Wolfe +1 202 353 4519 kristina.wolfe@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 702
Nature of Suit Habeas Corpus (General)
  Entries (1859) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1936 Filed: 5/18/2021, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1935 Filed: 12/5/2020, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1934 Filed: 10/19/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance- Pro Bono
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1933 Filed: 5/22/2020, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1932 Filed: 9/10/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1931 Filed: 9/9/2019, Entered: None Status Report
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1930 Filed: 9/5/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1929 Filed: 9/5/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1928 Filed: 9/5/2019, Entered: None Sealed Document
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1927 Filed: 9/5/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1926 Filed: 9/5/2019, Entered: None Sealed Document
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1925 Filed: 9/4/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1924 Filed: 8/22/2019, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1923 Filed: 8/22/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1921 Filed: 8/7/2019, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1920 Filed: 2/8/2019, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1919 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1918 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1915 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1914 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: None Response to (non-motion) Document
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1913 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1912 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None Response to (non-motion) Document
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1911 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1910 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1909 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1908 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1907 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1906 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1905 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Hearing
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1904 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: None Hearing
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1901 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1900 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1899 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1898 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1896 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1895 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1894 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1893 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: None Amicus Brief
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1891 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1890 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1889 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1888 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1887 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 1886 Filed: 1/18/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1885 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1884 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1882 Filed: 9/27/2017, Entered: None sealed reply
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1878 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1873 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1872 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1871 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1870 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1869 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1868 Filed: 2/4/2016, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1867 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1866 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1865 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1864 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1863 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1862 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1861 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1860 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1859 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1858 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1857 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1855 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1854 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1853 Filed: 1/19/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1852 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1851 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1850 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1849 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1848 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1847 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1846 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1845 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1844 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1843 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1842 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1841 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1840 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1839 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1838 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1837 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1836 Filed: 8/1/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1835 Filed: 8/1/2014, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1834 Filed: 8/1/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1833 Filed: 8/1/2014, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1769 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Vacating Prior Briefing Schedule, Setting a New Briefing Schedule, and Scheduling a Status Conference. On October 22, 2013, this Court held a status conference by telephone with counsel in this matter concerning this Court's Order 1768 setting a hearing date and briefing schedule on Petitioner's Motion 1748 for Partial Summary Judgment. Based on the representations of counsel for the parties during the status conference, it is hereby ORDERED that the briefing schedule previously set by the Court is VACATED. The government shall file its response to Petitioner's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by December 16, 2013. It is further ORDERED that the hearing on Petitioner's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment set by this Court in its previous Order 1768 is postponed pending further order of this Court. The Court shall hold a further status conference in this matter at 9:30 a.m. on December 18, 2013, and will set any further proceedings in this matter, if necessary, at that time. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on October 23, 2013. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 10/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1768 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 1763 Motion for Order; denying 1765 Motion to Stay. Upon consideration of Petitioner's Motion 1763 for an Order Setting a Hearing Date and Respondents' Motion 1765 to Stay, it is hereby ORDERED that Petitioner's Motion is GRANTED and Respondents' Motion is DENIED. It is further ORDERED that a hearing on Petitioner's Motion 1748 for Partial Summary Judgment is set for November 19, 2013, at 10:00 a.m. Respondents shall file their opposition to the Petitioner's Motion by October 30, 2013, and Petitioner shall file his reply by November 13, 2013. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on October 16, 2013. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 10/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1767 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. Attorney Thomas A. Gillice terminated. (Gillice, Thomas) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1766 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in opposition to re 1765 Cross MOTION to Stay re 1748 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on the First Claim of Petitioner's Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, 1763 MOTION for Order re PETITIONERS MOTION FOR AN ORDER SETTING A HEARING DATE ON PETITIONERS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THE FIRST CLAIM OF PETITIONERS AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS filed by AHMED ADNAN AHJAM. (Marshall, David) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1765 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Cross MOTION to Stay re 1748 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on the First Claim of Petitioner's Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, 1763 MOTION for Order re PETITIONERS MOTION FOR AN ORDER SETTING A HEARING DATE ON PETITIONERS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THE FIRST CLAIM OF PETITIONERS AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS [DOCKET NO. 1748] by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Soskin, Eric) (Entered: 10/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1764 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum in opposition to re 1763 MOTION for Order re PETITIONERS MOTION FOR AN ORDER SETTING A HEARING DATE ON PETITIONERS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THE FIRST CLAIM OF PETITIONERS AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS [DOCKET NO. 1748] filed by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Soskin, Eric) Modified on 10/9/2013 (jf, ). (Entered: 10/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1763 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Order re PETITIONERS MOTION FOR AN ORDER SETTING A HEARING DATE ON PETITIONERS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THE FIRST CLAIM OF PETITIONERS AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS [DOCKET NO. 1748] by AHMED ADNAN AHJAM (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Setting a Hearing Date)(Marshall, David) (Entered: 10/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 1762 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT filed by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. re 1760 Notice. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 10/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 1761 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT filed by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. re 1759 Notice. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 10/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1760 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing Under Seal (ISN 326) by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Levin, Scott) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1759 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing Under Seal (ISN 684) by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Levin, Scott) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1758 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ERRATA - Status Report Addressing The Privilege Team's Review of Documents and Materials Recovered From JTF-GTMO Camp 6 by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Status Report Filed Sept. 13, 2013, # 2 Exhibit Status Report filed Aug. 8, 2013)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 09/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1757 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT Addressing The Privilege Team's Review Of Materials Recovered From JTF-GTMO Camp 6 by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 1756 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT filed by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. re 1754 Notice. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 09/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 1755 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT filed by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. re 1753 Notice. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 09/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1754 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing Under Seal (ISN 326) by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Soskin, Eric) (Entered: 09/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1753 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing Under Seal (ISN 684) by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Levin, Scott) (Entered: 09/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 1752 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT filed by AHMED ADNAN AHJAM. re 1751 Notice. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 08/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1751 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing re Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Petitioner's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Declaratory Relief and Memorandum of Law in Support of Petitioner's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the First Claim of Petitioner's Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed under seal by AHMED ADNAN AHJAM (Marshall, David) (Entered: 08/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1750 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM re 1748 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on the First Claim of Petitioner's Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by AHMED ADNAN AHJAM by AHMED ADNAN AHJAM. (Marshall, David) (Entered: 08/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1749 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM re 1748 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on the First Claim of Petitioner's Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by AHMED ADNAN AHJAM by AHMED ADNAN AHJAM. (Marshall, David) (Entered: 08/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1748 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on the First Claim of Petitioner's Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by AHMED ADNAN AHJAM (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order re Petitioner's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the First Claim of Petitioner's Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus)(Marshall, David) (Entered: 08/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1747 Filed: 8/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE Of Memorandum Of Understanding Governing Private Counsel Representation Of Guantanamo Bay Detainees In Periodic Review Proceedings Pursuant To Executive Order 13567 by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 08/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1746 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE Of Privilege Team Review Of Documents And Materials Recovered From JTF-GTMO Camp 6 by GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES (Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 08/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 1745 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT filed by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. re 1743 Notice. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1744 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM by AHMED ADNAN AHJAM. (Marshall, David) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1743 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing Under Seal (ISN 326) by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Soskin, Eric) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 1742 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED Status Report filed by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. re 1741 Notice. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1741 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing Under Seal (ISN 684) by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Levin, Scott) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 1740 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED Response to motion filed by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. re 1739 . (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 07/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1739 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE re 1725 MOTION for Leave to File Redacted Version of Memo of Law on Public Docket (ISN 326) filed by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (Soskin, Eric) (Entered: 07/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 1738 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED ORDER re 1717 SEALED MOTION filed by AHMED ADNAN AHJAM. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 7/19/2013.(ztg, ) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1737 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 1728 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby ORDERED that David M. Barnes is admitted pro hac vice for purposes of this case. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on July 19, 2013. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1736 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 1727 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby ORDERED that Jonathan D. Letzring is admitted pro hac vice for purposes of this case. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on July 19, 2013. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1735 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 1718 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. It is hereby ORDERED that the response deadline for petitioner's sealed 1717 Motion of June 21, 2013, shall be set for July 12, 2013, nunc pro tunc. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on July 19, 2013. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1734 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Stay , Instanter by NADIR OMAR ABDULLAH BIN SA'ADO ALS'AARY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bryan, Edward) (Entered: 07/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1733 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT , Instanter by NADIR OMAR ABDULLAH BIN SA'ADO ALS'AARY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bryan, Edward) (Entered: 07/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 1732 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT filed by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. re 1731 Notice. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 07/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1731 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II re 1717 SEALED MOTION filed by AHMED ADNAN AHJAM. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Soskin, Eric) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1730 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM re 1727 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jonathan Letzring, :Firm- King & Spalding, filed by SHARGOWI LNU by SHARGOWI LNU. (Maher, Patricia) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1729 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM re 1728 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- David M. Barnes, :Firm- King & Spalding, filed by SHARGOWI LNU by SHARGOWI LNU. (Maher, Patricia) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1728 Filed: 7/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- David M. Barnes, :Firm- King & Spalding, by SHARGOWI LNU (Maher, Patricia) (Entered: 07/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1727 Filed: 7/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jonathan Letzring, :Firm- King & Spalding, by SHARGOWI LNU (Maher, Patricia) (Entered: 07/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1726 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LODGED SEALED DOCUMENT filed by AHMED ADNAN AHJAM. re 1724 NOTICE. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 07/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1725 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Redacted Version of Memo of Law on Public Docket by AHMED ADNAN AHJAM (Marshall, David) (Entered: 07/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1724 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING by AHMED ADNAN AHJAM (Marshall, David) Modified on 7/10/2013 to correct text(rdj). (Entered: 07/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1723 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE By Respondents Lifting Protected Information Designation Of Decisions By the Guantanamo Bay Review Task Force by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, ROBERT M. GATES, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit GTMO Task Force Chart)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 07/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 1722 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT re 1720 NOTICE of Filing Under Seal (ISN 326) filed by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf, ) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 1721 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT re 1719 NOTICE of Filing Under Seal - Respondents' Status Report - Mattan (ISN 684) filed by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf, ) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1720 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing Under Seal (ISN 326) by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Soskin, Eric) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1719 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing Under Seal - Respondents' Status Report - Mattan (ISN 684) v. Obama by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1718 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Petitioner's Sealed Motion (ISN 326) by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Soskin, Eric) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 1717 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED MOTION filed by AHMED ADNAN AHJAM. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)re 1715 Notice (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(zrdj) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1716 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 1715 Notice by AHMED ADNAN AHJAM . (Marshall, David) Modified on 6/24/2013 to add linkage (rdj). (Entered: 06/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1715 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING by AHMED ADNAN AHJAM (Marshall, David) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 1714 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT filed by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. re 1712 Notice. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 06/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 1713 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT filed by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. re 1711 Notice. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 06/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1712 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing Under Seal (ISN 326) by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Soskin, Eric) (Entered: 06/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1711 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Under Seal Filing -- Mattan (ISN 684) by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Levin, Scott) (Entered: 06/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 1710 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT filed by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. re 1709 Notice. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 05/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1709 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing Under Seal (ISN 326) by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Soskin, Eric) (Entered: 05/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 1708 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED Status Report filed by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. re 1707 Notice. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 05/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1707 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE Of Under Seal Filing -- Mattan (ISN 684) v. Obama -- Status Report by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 05/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1706 Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER to disregard order to show cause filed with the Clerk of Court on April 10, 2013. The order was miscaptioned, filed erroneously and never docketed. This case remains active and has not been dismissed. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on April 29, 2013. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 04/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1705 Filed: 4/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re 1702 . Counsel for Petitioner NADIR OMAR ABDULLAH BIN SA'ADO ALS'AARY may file a Status Report no later than July 15, 2013. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on April 10, 2013. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 04/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1704 Filed: 4/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 1703 Motion to Continue Stay. Case is stayed until 7/15/2013. That the Protective Order shall remain in effect. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on April 10, 2013. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 04/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1703 Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Continue Stay by NADIR OMAR ABDULLAH BIN SA'ADO ALS'AARY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bryan, Edward) (Entered: 04/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1702 Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT by NADIR OMAR ABDULLAH BIN SA'ADO ALS'AARY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bryan, Edward) (Entered: 04/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 1701 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED Status Report (ISN 326)filed by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. re 1699 Notice. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 1700 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED Status Report (ISN 684) filed by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. re 1698 Notice. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1699 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing Under Seal (ISN 326) by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Soskin, Eric) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1698 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of filing under seal (ISN 684) by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Levin, Scott) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1697 Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 1694 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on March 20, 2013. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 03/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1696 Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 1695 Joint MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Petitioner al-Hajj's (ISN 1457) Continued Access To Counsel. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on March 20, 2013. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 03/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1695 Filed: 3/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Petitioner al-Hajj's (ISN 1457) Continued Access To Counsel by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Levin, Scott) (Entered: 03/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1694 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Lauren Carasik, :Firm- Western New England School of Law, :Address- 1215 Wilbraham Rd, Springfield MA 01119. Phone No. - 413-782-1504. Fax No. - 000-000-0000 by MOHAMMED ABDULLAH TAHA MATTAN (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit MOU, # 2 Exhibit Acknowledgment)(Woodward, Gordon) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 1693 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT filed by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. re 1692 Notice. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 03/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1692 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (rdj) (Entered: 03/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 1691 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT filed by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. re 1690 Notice. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 03/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1690 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of filing under seal (ISN 684) by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Levin, Scott) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1689 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Appearance by Gordon Samuel Woodward on behalf of MOHAMMED ABDULLAH TAHA MATTAN (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit MOU, # 2 Exhibit Acknowledgement)(Woodward, Gordon) Modified on 3/1/2013 (rdj). (Entered: 02/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1688 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing Memorandum of Understanding by Carlos Warner by NADIR OMAR ABDULLAH BIN SA'ADO ALS'AARY re 573 Order (Warner, Carlos) (Entered: 02/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1687 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 1660 Sealed Motion to deem highlighted information protected. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on February 12, 2013. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 02/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 1686 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT filed by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. re 1684 Notice (Other) filed by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 1685 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT filed by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. re 1683 Notice (Other) filed by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1684 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing Under Seal (ISN 326) by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Soskin, Eric) (Entered: 02/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1683 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of filing under seal (ISN 684) by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Levin, Scott) (Entered: 02/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1682 Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT Public Factual Return for ISN 35 by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD (The original PDF Document contained privacy information and was restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Part 1, # 2 Exhibit Part 2, # 3 Exhibit Part 3, # 4 Exhibit Part 4, # 5 Exhibit Part 5, # 6 Exhibit Part 6)(Gilligan, James) (Entered: 01/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1681 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 1680 Motion to Continue. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on January 16, 2013.(lcrcl2) (Entered: 01/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1680 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Continue Stay by NADIR OMAR ABDULLAH BIN SA'ADO ALS'AARY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bryan, Edward) (Entered: 01/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1679 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT by NADIR OMAR ABDULLAH BIN SA'ADO ALS'AARY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bryan, Edward) (Entered: 01/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 1678 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED Status Report filed by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD. re 1676 Notice (Other). (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 01/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 1677 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED Status Report filed by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD. re 1675 Notice. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 01/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1676 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE Of Filing Under Seal - Respondents' Status Report Regarding Mohammed Abdullah Taha Mattan (ISN 684) by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD (Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 01/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1675 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE Of Filing Under Seal - Respondents' Status Report Regarding Petitioner Ahmed Adnan Mohammad Ahjam (ISN 326) by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD (Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 01/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 1674 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED Status Report For Ahmed Adnan Mohammad Ahjam (ISN 326) filed by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD. re 1672 Notice. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 12/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 1673 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT filed by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. re 1671 Notice. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 12/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1672 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE Of Filing Under Seal - Respondents' Status Report For Ahmed Adnan Mohammad Ahjam (ISN 326) by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD (Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 12/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1671 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Sealed Filing (ISN 684) by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Levin, Scott) (Entered: 12/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1670 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 1667 MOTION to Continue. Case is stayed until January 15, 2013, filed by NADIR OMAR ABDULLAH BIN SA'ADO ALS'AARY. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 11/6/12. (rje) (Entered: 11/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1669 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re 1666 Status Report filed by NADIR OMAR ABDULLAH BIN SA'ADO ALS'AARY. Petitioner may file a status report no later than January 15, 2013.Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on November 6, 2012. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 11/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1668 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ENTERED IN ERROR.....ORDER granting 1667 Motion to Continue. Case is stayed until January 13, 2013. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on November 6, 2012. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 11/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1667 Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Continue Stay by NADIR OMAR ABDULLAH BIN SA'ADO ALS'AARY (See docket entry 1666 to view document)(rdj) (Entered: 11/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1666 Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT /Unopposed Motion to Continue Stay by NADIR OMAR ABDULLAH BIN SA'ADO ALS'AARY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bryan, Edward) (Entered: 11/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 1665 Filed: 11/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT filed by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. re 1663 Notice. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 11/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 1664 Filed: 11/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT filed by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. re 1662 Notice. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 11/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1663 Filed: 11/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing Under Seal (ISN 326) by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Soskin, Eric) (Entered: 11/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1662 Filed: 11/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Sealed Filing (ISN 684) by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Levin, Scott) (Entered: 11/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1661 Filed: 10/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MARK H. BUZBY, ROBERT M. GATES, BRUCE VARGO, ROBERT GATES, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD. Attorney Trish Maskew terminated. (Maskew, Trish) (Entered: 10/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 1660 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED MOTION to Deem Protected Information Highlighted in the Accompanying Proposed Amended Factual Return for ISN 1457 filed by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)re 1659 Notice (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3 -- NARRATIVE, # 4 Exhibit 3 -- part 1, # 5 Exhibit 3 -- part 2, # 6 Exhibit 3 -- part 3, # 7 Exhibit 3 -- part 4, # 8 Exhibit 3 -- part 5, # 9 Exhibit 4)(zrdj) (Entered: 10/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1659 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Under Seal Filing: Motion to Deem Protected Information Highlighted in the Accompanying Proposed Amended Factual Return for ISN 1457 by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD (Murley, Nicole) (Entered: 10/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 1658 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT filed by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. re 1656 Notice (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 10/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 1657 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT filed by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. re 1655 . (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 10/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1656 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing Under Seal (ISN 326) by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Soskin, Eric) (Entered: 10/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1655 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Sealed Filing (ISN 684) by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Levin, Scott) (Entered: 10/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1654 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE Lifting Protected Information Designation of Decisions By The Guantanamo Bay Review Task Force Approving Detainees For Transfer by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1: Fried Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2: Chart Listing Current GTMO Detainees Approved For Transfer)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 09/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 1653 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT filed by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. re 1649 Notice. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 09/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 1652 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT filed by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. re 1648 . (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 09/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1651 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 1646 Motion for Extension of Time to file Status Report. It is THEREFORE ORDERED THAT counsel for Petitioner may file a Status Report no later than 11/2/2012. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 8/31/12. (rje) (Entered: 09/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1650 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 1647 Motion to Continue Stay. Further ORDERED that this is STAYED for 60-days. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 8/31/12. (rje) (Entered: 09/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1649 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing Under Seal (ISN 326) by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Soskin, Eric) (Entered: 09/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1648 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Sealed Filing (ISN 684) by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Levin, Scott) (Entered: 09/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1647 Filed: 8/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Continue Stay by NADIR OMAR ABDULLAH BIN SA'ADO ALS'AARY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bryan, Edward) (Entered: 08/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1646 Filed: 8/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Status Report by NADIR OMAR ABDULLAH BIN SA'ADO ALS'AARY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bryan, Edward) (Entered: 08/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1645 Filed: 8/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 1568 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Petitioner shall have until by 9/7/2011 to respond to Respondents' Motion for leave to File Motion for Expedited Judgment, nunc pro tunc, and the response filed that date shall be deemed timely. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 8/28/12. (rje) (Entered: 08/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 1644 Filed: 8/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT filed by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. re 1643 Notice. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 08/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1643 Filed: 8/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing Under Seal (ISN 326) by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Soskin, Eric) (Entered: 08/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 1642 Filed: 8/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT filed by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. re 1641 Notice. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 08/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1641 Filed: 8/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Sealed Filing (ISN 684) by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Levin, Scott) (Entered: 08/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 1640 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT filed by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf, ) (Entered: 07/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 1639 Filed: 7/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT filed by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd, ) (Entered: 07/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1638 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing Under Seal (ISN 326) by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Soskin, Eric) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1637 Filed: 7/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Sealed Filing (ISN 684) by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Levin, Scott) (Entered: 07/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1636 Filed: 6/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 1630 Motion for Leave to File Status Report. Further ORDERED that petitioners Unopposed Motion to Continue Stay is granted. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 6/4/12. (rje) (Modified on 6/5/2012 (rje, ). (Entered: 06/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 1635 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED Status Report filed by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. re 1633 Notice. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 06/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 1634 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED Status Report filed by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. re 1632 Notice (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 06/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1633 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing Under Seal (ISN 326) by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Soskin, Eric) (Entered: 06/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1632 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Sealed Filing (ISN 684) by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Levin, Scott) (Entered: 06/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1631 Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT /Unopposed Motion to Continue Stay by NADIR OMAR ABDULLAH BIN SA'ADO ALS'AARY. (Bryan, Edward) (Entered: 05/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1630 Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Status Report/Unopposed Motion To Stay, Instanter by NADIR OMAR ABDULLAH BIN SA'ADO ALS'AARY (Bryan, Edward). Added MOTION to Stay on 5/3/2012 (rdj). (Counsel is instructed to docket all parts of the motion in the future) (Entered: 05/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 1629 Filed: 5/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT filed by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. re 1627 Notice (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 05/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 1628 Filed: 5/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT filed by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. re 1626 Notice (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 05/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1627 Filed: 5/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Sealed Filing (ISN 684) by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Levin, Scott) (Entered: 05/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1626 Filed: 5/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing Under Seal (ISN 326) by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Soskin, Eric) (Entered: 05/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1625 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing Public Factual Return for ISN 441 by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit)(Maskew, Trish) (Entered: 04/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 1624 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT filed by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. re 1622 Notice (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 04/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 1623 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED Status Report filed by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. re 1621 Notice (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 04/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1622 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing Under Seal (ISN 326) by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Soskin, Eric) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1621 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Sealed Filing (ISN 684) by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Levin, Scott) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1620 Filed: 3/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE Of Under Seal Filing by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD (Murley, Nicole) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/30/2012: # 1 Main Document) (jf, ). (Entered: 03/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 1619 Filed: 3/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT filed by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. re 1617 Notice (Other) filed by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 03/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 1618 Filed: 3/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT filed by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. re 1616 Notice (Other) filed by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 03/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1617 Filed: 3/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE Of Filing Under Seal - Status Report In Response To Court's July 2, 2009 Order - Mattan (ISN 684) v. Obama by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 03/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1616 Filed: 3/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing Under Seal (ISN 326) by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Soskin, Eric) (Entered: 03/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 1615 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT filed by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. re 1613 Notice filed by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 02/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 1614 Filed: 2/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT filed by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. re 1612 Notice filed by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 02/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1613 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing Under Seal (ISN 326) by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Soskin, Eric) (Entered: 02/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1612 Filed: 2/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Sealed Filing (ISN 684) by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Levin, Scott) (Entered: 02/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1611 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, DONALD RUMSFELD. Attorney David Hugh White terminated. (White, David) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1610 Filed: 1/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to ABDURAHMAN LNU. Attorney Vicki Werneke terminated. (Werneke, Vicki) (Entered: 01/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1609 Filed: 1/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to ABDURAHMAN LNU. Attorney Amy B. Cleary terminated. (Cleary, Amy) (Entered: 01/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 1608 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED Status Report filed by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. re 1606 Notice (Other) filed by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 01/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 1607 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED Status Report filed by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. re 1605 Notice (Other) filed by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 01/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1606 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing Under Seal (ISN 326) by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Soskin, Eric) (Entered: 01/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1605 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE Of Sealed Filing - Mattan (ISN 684) v. Obama by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Levin, Scott) (Entered: 01/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1604 Filed: 12/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing Under Seal (ISN 326) by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Soskin, Eric) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/4/2011: # 1 Sealed Document) (jf, ). (Entered: 12/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1603 Filed: 12/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE Of Sealed Filing - Mattan (ISN 684) v. Obama by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Warden, Andrew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/4/2011: # 1 Sealed Document) (jf, ). (Entered: 12/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1602 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 1599 Motion to Continue Stay.. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 11/2/11. (rje, ) (Entered: 11/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 1601 Filed: 11/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT filed by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. re 1597 Notice filed by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 11/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 1600 Filed: 11/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED Status Report filed by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. re 1596 Notice filed by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 11/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1599 Filed: 11/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Continue Stay by NADIR OMAR ABDULLAH BIN SA'ADO ALS'AARY (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bryan, Edward) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1598 Filed: 11/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT /Unopposed Motion to Continue Stay by NADIR OMAR ABDULLAH BIN SA'ADO ALS'AARY. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bryan, Edward) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1597 Filed: 11/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing Under Seal (ISN 326) by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Soskin, Eric) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1596 Filed: 11/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing of Respondents' Status Report - Mattan (ISN 684) v. Obama by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1595 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 1593 Joint Motion to dismiss Without Prejudice. ORDERED that the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Sharqawi Abdu Ali Al-Hajj be and hereby is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/27/11. (rje, ) (Entered: 10/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1594 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying as Moot 1592 Motion for Order.. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/27/11. (rje, ) (Entered: 10/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1593 Filed: 10/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Order TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE SHARQAWI ABDU ALI AL-HAJJ (ISN 1457)S PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS by SHARQAWI ABDU ALI-AL HAAG (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Maher, Patricia) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1592 Filed: 10/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Order TO ENLARGE TIME TO RESPOND TO MOTION FOR EXPEDITED JUDGMENT by SHARQAWI ABDU ALI-AL HAAG (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Maher, Patricia) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1591 Filed: 10/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENTERED IN ERROR.....Unopposed MOTION for Order TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE SHARQAWI ABDU ALI AL-HAJJ (ISN 1457)S PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS by SHARQAWI ABDU ALI-AL HAAG (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Maher, Patricia) Modified on 10/27/2011 (rdj). (Entered: 10/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1590 Filed: 10/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENTERED IN ERROR.....Joint MOTION to Dismiss WITHOUT PREJUDICE SHARQAWI ABDU ALI AL-HAJJ (ISN 1457)S PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS by SHARQAWI ABDU ALI-AL HAAG (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Maher, Patricia) Modified on 10/27/2011 (rdj). (Entered: 10/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1589 Filed: 10/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ENTERED IN ERROR.....Unopposed MOTION for Order TO ENLARGE TIME TO RESPOND TO MOTION FOR EXPEDITED JUDGMENT by SHARQAWI ABDU ALI-AL HAAG (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Maher, Patricia) Modified on 10/27/2011 (rdj). (Entered: 10/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1588 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unclassified ORDER granting respondents' Motion for Leave to File Motion for Expedited Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on September 23, 2011. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 10/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1587 Filed: 10/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 1586 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Petitioner Response to Respondents Motion for Expedited Judgment due by 10/27/2011. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/12/11. (rje, ) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1586 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion for Expedited Judgment by SHARQAWI ABDU ALI-AL HAAG (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order to Enlarge Time)(Maher, Patricia) (Entered: 10/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1585 Filed: 10/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Soskin, Eric) (Entered: 10/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 1584 Filed: 10/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED Status Report filed by BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 10/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 1583 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED Status Report filed by BARACK OBAMA. re 1581 Notice (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 10/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1582 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to AHMED ADNAN AHJAM. Attorney David H. Remes terminated. (Remes, David) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1581 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE Status Report (ISN 684) by BARACK OBAMA (Levin, Scott) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1580 Filed: 9/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE Pursuant to CMO Section I.D.1 With Respect to Respondents' Motion for Expedited Judgment (re ISN 1457) by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (White, David) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1578 Filed: 9/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Leave to File Motion for Expedited Judgment (re ISN 1457) by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD re 1565 Notice (Other) (White, David) (Entered: 09/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1577 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDERED that Respondents shall file notice under Section I.D.1 of Judge Hogan's Case Management Order by or on 10/3/2011. FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner shall file a Traverse, or otherwise respond within 60 days of the date on which respondents file notice under Section I.D.1.. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/12/11. (rje, ) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1576 Filed: 9/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING UNDER SEAL PETITIONERS MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE BY RESPONDENTS WITH MAY 23, 2011 ORDER AND MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO RESPONDENTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR EXPEDITED JUDGMENT AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH MAY 23, 2011 ORDER by SHARQAWI ABDU ALI-AL HAAG (Maher, Patricia) (Entered: 09/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 1575 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED Status Report filed by BARACK OBAMA. re 1574 Notice (Other) (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 09/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1574 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing - Status Report (ISN 684) by BARACK OBAMA (Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 09/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1573 Filed: 9/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting re 1558 MOTION to Stay filed by NADIR OMAR ABDULLAH BIN SA'ADO ALS'AARY. FURTHER ORDERED that this case is STAYED indefinitely. Status Report due by 11/1/2011.. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 8/30/11. (rje, ) (Entered: 09/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1572 Filed: 9/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 1559 Motion for Extension of Time to File Notice Pursuant to CMO Section I.D.1 (re ISN 1457). Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 8/30/11. (rje, ) (Entered: 09/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1571 Filed: 9/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by BARACK OBAMA (Soskin, Eric) (Entered: 09/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 1570 Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED MOTION to Deem Protected Information Highlighted in the Accompanying Proposed Public Factual Return for ISN 30 filed by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)re: 1569 Notice (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3 (Part 1 of 2), # 4 Exhibit 3 (Part 2 of 2), # 5 Exhibit 3 - Narrative, # 6 Exhibit 4)(zrdj) (Entered: 09/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1569 Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing Respondents Motion to Deem Protected Information Highlighted in the Accompanying Proposed Public Factual Return for ISN 30 by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Maskew, Trish) (Entered: 08/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1568 Filed: 8/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply TO RESPONDENTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR EXPEDITED JUDGMENT by SHARQAWI ABDU ALI-AL HAAG (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Maher, Patricia) (Entered: 08/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1567 Filed: 8/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ENTERED IN ERROR.....Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply TO RESPONDENTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR EXPEDITED JUDGMENT by SHARQAWI ABDU ALI-AL HAAG (Maher, Patricia) Modified on 8/26/2011 (znmw, ). (Entered: 08/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 1566 Filed: 8/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED ORDER (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons, Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 8/19/2011.(hs) (Entered: 08/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1565 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing Motion for Leave to File Motion for Expedited Judgment re Petitioner Sharqawi al-Hajj (ISN 1457) by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (White, David) (Entered: 08/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1564 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ENTERED IN ERROR.....SEALED Motion to Deem Protected Information Highlighted in the Accompanying Proposed Public Factual Return for ISN 30 filed by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3 Part 1, # 4 Exhibit 3 Part 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4)(zjf, ) Modified on 8/30/2011 (zrdj). (Entered: 08/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1563 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing Respondents Motion to Deem Protected Information Highlighted in the Accompanying Proposed Public Factual Return for ISN 30 by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Maskew, Trish) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1562 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Trish Maskew on behalf of MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Maskew, Trish) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1561 Filed: 8/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 1557 Motion for Extension of Time to; granting 1558 Motion to Stay. Respondents amended factual return and to serve petitioner's counsel due by 10/4/2011. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 8/4/11. (rje, ) (Entered: 08/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1560 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Proposed Order by NADIR OMAR ABDULLAH BIN SA'ADO ALS'AARY re 1558 MOTION to Stay, 1554 Status Report (Bryan, Edward) (Entered: 08/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1559 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Notice Pursuant to CMO Section I.D.1 (re ISN 1457) by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(White, David) (Entered: 08/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1558 Filed: 8/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Continue Stay by NADIR OMAR ABDULLAH BIN SA'ADO ALS'AARY (See docket entry 1554 to view document)(rdj) (Entered: 08/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1557 Filed: 8/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to PREPARE AN UNCLASSIFIED VERSION OF THE AMENDED FACTUAL RETURN by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Koenig, Michael) (Entered: 08/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 1556 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED Status Report (ISN 684) filed by BARACK OBAMA. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf, ) (Entered: 08/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 1555 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED Status Report (ISN 326) filed by BARACK OBAMA. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf, ) (Entered: 08/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1554 Filed: 8/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT /Unopposed Motion to Continue Stay by NADIR OMAR ABDULLAH BIN SA'ADO ALS'AARY. (Bryan, Edward) (Entered: 08/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1553 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing Under Seal (ISN 326) by BARACK OBAMA (Soskin, Eric) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 1552 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED MOTION to Deem Protected Information Highlighted in the Accompanying Proposed Public Factual Return for ISN 441 filed by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(zjf, ) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1551 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing Under Seal (ISN 684) by BARACK OBAMA (Levin, Scott) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1550 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of under seal filing: Motion to Deem Protected Information Highlighted in the Accompanying Proposed Public Factual Return for ISN 441 by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Murley, Nicole) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1549 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing of Public Factual Return (ISN 1457) by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Attachments: # 1 Supplement, # 2 Supplement, # 3 Supplement, # 4 Supplement, # 5 Supplement, # 6 Supplement, # 7 Supplement, # 8 Supplement, # 9 Supplement, # 10 Supplement, # 11 Supplement)(Koenig, Michael) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1548 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Thomas Koenig on behalf of MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Koenig, Michael) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1547 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Newcomb Murley on behalf of GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT M. GATES, BARACK OBAMA, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR, BRUCE VARGO, MIKE BUMGARNER, BRICE GYURISKO, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Murley, Nicole) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1546 Filed: 7/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 1544 Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report due by 8/2/2011. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 7/25/11. (rje, ) (Entered: 07/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1545 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE Of Filing Amended Factual Return re Petitioner Al-Hajj (ISN 1457) by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (White, David) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1544 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by NADIR OMAR ABDULLAH BIN SA'ADO ALS'AARY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bryan, Edward) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 1543 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT filed by BARACK OBAMA. re 1541 Notice (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 07/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 1542 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT filed by BARACK OBAMA. re 1540 Notice (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 07/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1541 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing Status Report by BARACK OBAMA (Soskin, Eric) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1540 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing Under Seal (ISN 684) by BARACK OBAMA (Levin, Scott) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1539 Filed: 6/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDERED, that Petitioner's unopposed motion to seal the proposed public factual return is granted. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 6/21/11. (rje, ) (Entered: 06/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1538 Filed: 6/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 1533 Sealed Motion. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 6/21/11. (rje, ) (Entered: 06/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1537 Filed: 6/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 1536 Consent Motion for Enlargement of Time. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on June 22, 2011. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1536 Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Factual Return by BARACK OBAMA (Gillice, Thomas) (Entered: 06/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 1535 Filed: 6/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED Response to Motion filed by AHMED ADNAN AHJAM. re 1534 Notice (Other) filed by AHMED ADNAN AHJAM. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(zrdj) (Entered: 06/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1534 Filed: 6/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING UNDER SEAL by AHMED ADNAN AHJAM (Marshall, David) (Entered: 06/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 1533 Filed: 6/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED Unopposed MOTION to Deem Protect Information Highlighted in the Accompanying Proposed Public Factual Return for ISN 326 filed by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Part 1 of 2, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Part 2 of 2, # 5 Exhibit 4)(zjf, ) (Entered: 06/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1532 Filed: 6/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing Unopposed Motion to Deem Protect Information Highlighted in the Accompanying Proposed Public Factual Return for ISN 326 by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Wolfe, Kristina) (Entered: 06/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1531 Filed: 6/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ERRATA. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on June 8, 2011. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1530 Filed: 6/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unclassified ORDER denying in part and granting in part petitioner's Motion 1472 to Strike Statements in Factual Return. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on May 23, 2011. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1529 Filed: 6/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unclassified MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on May 23, 2011. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1528 Filed: 6/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unclassified ORDER denying respondents' ex parte motion 1520 . Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on May 23, 2011. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1527 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 1493 Sealed Motion. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 6/2/11. (rje, ) (Entered: 06/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1526 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 1518 Sealed Motion. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 6/1/11. (rje, ) (Entered: 06/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 1525 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT filed by BARACK OBAMA. re 1524 Notice (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 06/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1524 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing Under Seal (ISN 684) by BARACK OBAMA (Levin, Scott) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 1523 Filed: 6/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT filed by BARACK OBAMA. re 1522 Notice. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1522 Filed: 6/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by BARACK OBAMA (Soskin, Eric) (Entered: 06/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 1521 Filed: 5/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED Status Report filed by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. re 1519 Notice. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 05/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1520 Filed: 5/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING CLASSIFIED MOTION by BARACK OBAMA (Gillice, Thomas) (Entered: 05/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1519 Filed: 5/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing Under Seal (ISN 684) by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Levin, Scott) (Entered: 05/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 1518 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED MOTION re 1516 filed by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3 -- Part 1, # 4 Exhibit 3 -- Part 2 Exhibits 1 of 2, # 5 Exhibit 3 -- Part 3 Exhibits 2 of 2, # 6 Exhibit 4)(zrdj) (Entered: 04/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 1517 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT filed by MOHAMMED ABDULLAH TAHA MATTAN. re 1515 Notice filed by MOHAMMED ABDULLAH TAHA MATTAN. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(zrdj) (Entered: 04/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1516 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing Motion under Seal by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 04/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1515 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by MOHAMMED ABDULLAH TAHA MATTAN (Woodward, Gordon) (Entered: 04/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1514 Filed: 4/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting re 1513 Unopposed MOTION for Order to Set New Briefing Schedule filed by SHARQAWI ABDU ALI-AL HAAG Petitioner's Reply due by 4/25/2011.. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 4/8/11. (rje, ) (Entered: 04/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1513 Filed: 4/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Order to Set New Briefing Schedule by SHARQAWI ABDU ALI-AL HAAG (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Text of Proposed Order to Set New Briefing Schedule)(Maher, Patricia) (Entered: 04/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 1512 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT filed by BARACK OBAMA. re 1510 Notice filed by BARACK OBAMA. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 04/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 1511 Filed: 4/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT filed by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. re 1509 Notice filed by JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, BARACK OBAMA, MIKE BUMGARNER. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 04/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1510 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by BARACK OBAMA (Soskin, Eric) (Entered: 04/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1509 Filed: 4/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing Under Seal (ISN 684) by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Kelly, Wynne) (Entered: 04/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1508 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDERED re 1487 Status Report filed by NADIR OMAR ABDULLAH BIN SA'ADO ALS'AARY is STAYED for a period of 120 days. FURTHERMORE ORDERED re 1432 Unopposed MOTION to Stay filed by NADIR OMAR ABDULLAH BIN SA'ADO ALS'AARY is DENIED as MOOT. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 3/28/11. (rje) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1507 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA. (McDonald, Kristofer) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1506 Filed: 3/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying as MOOT 1432 Motion to Stay. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 3/14/11. (rje) (Entered: 03/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1505 Filed: 3/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) discharging the order to show cause, granting the motion to exceed the page limit, ordering the Clerk to file the lodged joint response, and vacating the District Court's order requiring advance notice of transfer as to (42 in 1:05-cv-00833-UNA, 48 in 1:05-cv-01347-UNA, 83 in 1:05-cv-00359-GK, 47 in 1:05-cv-01457-GK, 20 in 1:05-cv-02083-JDB, 54 in 1:05-cv-00877-JR, 22 in 1:06-cv-01759-JDB, 76 in 1:05-cv-01505-RMC, 99 in 1:04-cv-02035-GK, 70 in 1:05-cv-00999-RBW, 63 in 1:05-cv-02199-UNA, 74 in 1:05-cv-01638-CKK, 33 in 1:04-cv-01937-UNA, 49 in 1:06-cv-01684-UNA, 83 in 1:04-cv-02215-RMC, 75 in 1:05-cv-02185-RCL, 60 in 1:05-cv-02104-RBW, 90 in 1:05-cv-01490-UNA, 43 in 1:06-cv-01766-UNA, 111 in 1:05-cv-02384-RWR, 46 in 1:05-cv-02385-ESH, 51 in 1:05-cv-02088-RWR, 28 in 1:05-cv-01725-UNA, 111 in 1:05-cv-01429-RMU, 60 in 1:06-cv-00618-RWR, 40 in 1:06-cv-01758-RMC, 72 in 1:05-cv-01504-UNA, 50 in 1:05-cv-00748-RMC, 49 in 1:05-cv-00883-RBW, 130 in 1:05-cv-00520-UNA, 68 in 1:05-cv-01607-RMU, 50 in 1:05-cv-01458-ESH -AK, 13 in 1:06-cv-01688-RMC, 194 in 1:04-cv-01136-UNA, 44 in 1:05-cv-01189-UNA, 32 in 1:05-cv-01649-RBW, 109 in 1:05-cv-00270-JR, 21 in 1:05-cv-00995-UNA, 31 in 1:07-cv-01710-RBW, 60 in 1:05-cv-00526-RMU, 39 in 1:07-cv-02337-HHK, 91 in 1:05-cv-01353-UNA, 39 in 1:05-cv-00881-JR, 48 in 1:05-cv-01646-UNA, 204 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH, 39 in 1:07-cv-02338-HHK, 102 in 1:05-cv-02479-HHK, 81 in 1:05-cv-02249-RMC, 100 in 1:05-cv-01124-RMC, 58 in 1:05-cv-00634-RWR, 87 in 1:05-cv-01555-JR, 56 in 1:05-cv-02349-UNA, 66 in 1:05-cv-02379-JR, 67 in 1:05-cv-00764-CKK -AK, 39 in 1:05-cv-02010-HHK, 64 in 1:05-cv-01983-RMU, 96 in 1:05-cv-01592-UNA, 92 in 1:05-cv-00329-PLF, 114 in 1:05-cv-00023-RWR, 103 in 1:05-cv-02367-RWR, 521 in 1:10-cv-01020-RJL, 60 in 1:05-cv-00392-UNA, 48 in 1:05-cv-00998-RMU, 62 in 1:06-cv-01767-RMU, 26 in 1:06-cv-01668-UNA, 58 in 1:05-cv-01497-UNA, 46 in 1:06-cv-01765-UNA, 52 in 1:05-cv-01971-RMC, 25 in 1:05-cv-02444-RMC, 71 in 1:05-cv-02380-CKK, 521 in 1:09-cv-00745-RCL, 135 in 1:05-cv-01509-RMU, 11 in 1:08-cv-01104-CKK, 17 in 1:05-cv-02200-JDB, 66 in 1:05-cv-00763-JDB, 521 in 1:05-cv-02386-RBW, 54 in 1:05-cv-01645-UNA, 172 in 1:04-cv-02022-PLF, 102 in 1:05-cv-00569-EGS, 32 in 1:05-cv-01623-RWR, 47 in 1:05-cv-01244-CKK, 54 in 1:05-cv-00889-UNA, 48 in 1:05-cv-01639-RBW, 216 in 1:04-cv-01194-TFH, 83 in 1:05-cv-00492-UNA, 66 in 1:05-cv-02371-UNA, 38 in 1:05-cv-01236-RWR, 19 in 1:06-cv-01691-GK, 16 in 1:08-cv-01101-JDB, 29 in 1:05-cv-02381-JDB, 62 in 1:05-cv-00892-CKK, 83 in 1:05-cv-01601-UNA, 255 in 1:04-cv-01254-HHK, 85 in 1:05-cv-00247-UNA, 54 in 1:06-cv-01690-RBW, 68 in 1:05-cv-02186-UNA, 34 in 1:05-cv-02387-RMC, 14 in 1:08-cv-01085-PLF, 126 in 1:05-cv-01048-RMU, 77 in 1:05-cv-01506-RMC, 24 in 1:06-cv-01674-RMC, 61 in 1:05-cv-00994-JDB, 36 in 1:05-cv-02477-RMU, 93 in 1:05-cv-01704-RMU, 77 in 1:04-cv-02046-CKK, 121 in 1:04-cv-01164-RBW, 143 in 1:05-cv-00280-GK) Notices of Appeal filed by MICHAEL BUMGARNER, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, JAY HOOD, BRUCE VARGO, BRICE GYURISKO, NELSON J. CANNON, DAVID M. THOMAS, JR., DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, WADE F. DENNIS, GEORGE WALKER BUSH, J. HOOD, WADE F. DAVIS, MARK H. BUZBY, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR., COMMANDER OF THE JOINT TASK FORCE, GTMO, ROBERT M. GATES, GORDON R. ENGLAND, COMMANDER OF PRISON CAMP, GTMO, and TERRY CARRICO; USCA Case Number: 08-5233 (consolidated with 08-5234-08-5262, 08-5264-08-5270, 08-5272-08-5278, 08-5280-08-5286, 08-5288, 08-5289, 08-5291-08-5297, 08-5299-08-5306, 08-5308-08-5315, 08-5317-08-5323, 08-5325-08-5330, 08-5332-08-5336, 08-5338-08-5343, and 08-5345-08-5347.) (tnr, ) (Entered: 03/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1504 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting Motion for Leave to Amend the Factual Return. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 3/11/11. (rje, ) (Entered: 03/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1503 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 1495 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Donna M. Grill terminated. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 3/11/11. (zrje, ) (Entered: 03/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1502 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDERED that a new briefing schedule will be set after Respondents' filing of their Opposition to 1490 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Petitioner Reply due by 2/4/2011. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 3/11/11. (rje, ) (Entered: 03/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1501 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE Of Entry Of Protective Order Governing Military Commission Proceedings by BARACK H. OBAMA, ROBERT M. GATES (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Military Commission Protective Order)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1500 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing Motion for Leave to Amend Factual Return re ISN 1457 by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(White, David) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 1499 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT re 1498 Notice filed by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1498 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing Under Seal (ISN 684) by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Kelly, Wynne) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 1497 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT re 1496 Noticefiled by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1496 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing Under Seal re ISN 326 by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Soskin, Eric) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1495 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by NADIR OMAR ABDULLAH BIN SA'ADO ALS'AARY (Grill, Donna) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1494 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM by SHARQAWI ABDU ALI-AL HAAG. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit to Notice of Filing Including (A) Katherine Vitale Lopezs signed Memorandum of Understanding Regarding Access to Classified National Security Information and (B) signed Acknowledgement)(Maher, Patricia) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 1493 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED MOTION RE 1492 Notice filed by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(zrdj) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1492 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing of Respondents' Motion Re: Proposed Public Factual Return for ISN 035 by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Marcus, Lisa) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1491 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing of Respondent's Opposition to Petitioner's Motion to Strike Statements by BARACK OBAMA re 1472 MOTION to Strike Statements in the Factual Return (Gillice, Thomas) (Entered: 02/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1490 Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by SHARQAWI ABDU ALI-AL HAAG (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Maher, Patricia) (Entered: 02/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 1489 Filed: 2/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT re 1488 Notice filed by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 02/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1488 Filed: 2/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing Under Seal re ISN 326 by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (White, David) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1487 Filed: 2/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT by NADIR OMAR ABDULLAH BIN SA'ADO ALS'AARY. (Bryan, Edward) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 1486 Filed: 2/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT re 1485 Notice filed by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1485 Filed: 2/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing Under Seal (ISN 684) by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Kelly, Wynne) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1484 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting Respondent's 1482 Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition by 2/4/2011. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 1/14/11. (rje, ) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1483 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDERED re 1432 that the parties meet and confer and provide a current status report to the Court within 14 days of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 1/14/11. (rje) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1482 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 1472 MOTION to Strike Statements in the Factual Return by BARACK OBAMA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillice, Thomas) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 1481 Filed: 1/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED ORDER re 1480 SEALED MOTION filed by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 1/12/2011.(tcb ) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 1480 Filed: 1/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED MOTION to Deem Protected Information Highlighted in the Accompanying Proposed Public Factual Return for ISN 1457 filed by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(zjf, ) (Entered: 01/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1479 Filed: 1/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing under Seal by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Guzman, Javier) (Entered: 01/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1478 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. Attorney Keith Simmons terminated. (Simmons, Keith) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 1477 Filed: 1/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED Status Report (ISN 326) filed by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf, ) (Entered: 01/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 1476 Filed: 1/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED Status Report (ISN 684) filed by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf, ) (Entered: 01/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1475 Filed: 1/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing Under Seal (ISN 684) by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Kelly, Wynne) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1474 Filed: 1/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing Under Seal (ISN 326) by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Simmons, Keith) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1473 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to MOHAMMED ABDULLAH TAHA MATTAN. Attorney Sozi P. Tulante terminated. (Woodward, Gordon) (Entered: 12/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1472 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Strike Statements in the Factual Return by SHARQAWI ABDU ALI-AL HAAG (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- AL-Haag Declaration, # 2 Exhibit B- Wilhelm Declaration, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Maher, Patricia) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 1471 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT filed by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. re #1470 Notice (Other) filed by JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, BARACK OBAMA, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 12/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1470 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing Under Seal (ISN 326) by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Simmons, Keith) (Entered: 12/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 1469 Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT filed by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. re #1468 Notice (Other) filed by JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, BARACK OBAMA, MIKE BUMGARNER. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 12/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1468 Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing Under Seal (ISN 684) by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Kelly, Wynne) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1467 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 1462 Motion for Extension of Time to file Motion to Strike. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 11/19/10. (rje, ) (Entered: 11/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1466 Filed: 11/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of filing of Memorandum of Understanding of Mahmoud Khatib by AHMED ADNAN AHJAM (Remes, David) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1465 Filed: 11/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of filing of Memorandum of Understanding of David H. Remes by AHMED ADNAN AHJAM (Remes, David) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1464 Filed: 11/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Appearance by David H. Remes on behalf of AHMED ADNAN AHJAM (Remes, David) Modified on 11/18/2010 (rdj). (Entered: 11/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1463 Filed: 11/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by David H. Remes on behalf of AHMED ADNAN AHJAM (Remes, David) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1462 Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to FILE MOTION TO STRIKE by SHARQAWI ABDU ALI-AL HAAG (Maher, Patricia) (Entered: 11/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1461 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDERED Petitioner's Motions to strike due by 12/1/2010. Respondents' Response due by 1/21/2011 Petitioner's Reply due by 2/4/2011. Respondents'Notice, if any, that they will move to compel filing of a traverse due by 11/30/2010. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/28/10. (rje, ) (Entered: 11/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 1460 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT filed by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. re #1459 Notice filed by JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, BARACK OBAMA, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 11/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1459 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing Under Seal (ISN 326) by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Simmons, Keith) (Entered: 11/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 1458 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED Status Report filed by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(rdj) (Entered: 11/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1457 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing Under Seal (ISN 684) by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Kelly, Wynne) (Entered: 11/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1456 Filed: 10/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to MOHAMMED ABDULLAH TAHA MATTAN. Attorney William T. Hangley and Rebecca Y. Starr terminated. (Tulante, Sozi) (Entered: 10/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 1455 Filed: 10/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT filed by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1454 Filed: 10/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing Under Seal (ISN 326) by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Simmons, Keith) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1453 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT : Joint Pre-Hearing Statement by BARACK OBAMA. (Marcus, Lisa) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 1452 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED Status Report filed by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1451 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing Under Seal (ISN 684) by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Kelly, Wynne) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1450 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. Attorney Steve Ray Matheny terminated. (Matheny, Steve) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1449 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Wynne Patrick Kelly on behalf of MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Kelly, Wynne) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1448 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas A. Gillice on behalf of BARACK OBAMA (Gillice, Thomas) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1447 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting respondents' motion to amend and for clarification of the 1/14/10 order. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 7/27/10 nunc pro tunc to 7/23/10. This order originally was filed in 08-mc-442 but also should have been docketed in all cases captioned herein. (Entered: 09/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 1446 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT re 1445 Notice (Other) filed by JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, BARACK OBAMA, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zdr) (Entered: 09/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1445 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing Under Seal (ISN 326) by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Simmons, Keith) (Entered: 09/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 1444 Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT filed by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 09/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1443 Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing Under Seal (ISN 684) by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Matheny, Steve) (Entered: 08/31/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 1442 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT filed by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 08/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1441 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing Under Seal (ISN 326) by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Simmons, Keith) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 1440 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT filed by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1439 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Compliance by BARACK OBAMA (Marcus, Lisa) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1438 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing Under Seal (ISN 684) by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Matheny, Steve) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1437 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to MOHAMMED AHMED SLAM AL-KHATEEB. Attorney Kristin Ann Meister terminated. (Fee, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1436 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to SHARQAWI ABDU ALI-AL HAAG, SHARGOWI LNU. Attorney Brian C. Spahn terminated. (Spahn, Brian) (Entered: 07/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1435 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to SHARGOWI LNU. Attorney Kristin B. Wilhelm terminated. (Wilhelm, Kristin) (Entered: 07/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1434 Filed: 7/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Respondents' Memorandum in Response to Petitioner's Motion for Indefinite Stay (ISN 30) by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (White, David) (Entered: 07/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1433 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Kristofer Ryan McDonald on behalf of MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (McDonald, Kristofer) (Entered: 07/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1432 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION to Stay by NADIR OMAR ABDULLAH BIN SA'ADO ALS'AARY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bryan, Edward) (Entered: 07/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1431 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Amended MOTION for Extension of Time Regarding Propsed Public Returns by BARACK H. OBAMA (Attachments: # 1 Revised Proposed Order)(Marcus, Lisa) (Entered: 07/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1430 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to ABDURAHMAN LNU. Attorney Timothy C. Ivey terminated. (Ivey, Timothy) (Entered: 07/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1429 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to ABDURAHMAN LNU. Attorney Jonathan P. Witmer-Rich terminated. (Cleary, Amy) (Entered: 07/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 1428 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT filed by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(rdj) (Entered: 07/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1427 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing of Reply Brief in Further Support of Respondents Motion to Amend and for Clarification of the Courts January 14, 2010 Order Regarding Public Returns (Marcus, Lisa) (Entered: 07/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1426 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (Respondents Consent Motion for a Five Page Enlargement of the Page Limitation for Their Reply Brief) by BARACK OBAMA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marcus, Lisa) (Entered: 07/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1425 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing Under Seal (ISN 326) by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Simmons, Keith) (Entered: 07/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 1424 Filed: 6/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT filed by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztr ) (Entered: 06/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1423 Filed: 6/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing Under Seal (ISN 684) by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Matheny, Steve) (Entered: 06/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1422 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by BARACK H. OBAMA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marcus, Lisa) (Entered: 06/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1421 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth. Judge Richard J. Leon no longer assigned to the case. (jeb, ) (Entered: 06/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1420 Filed: 6/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER addressing ISN 685. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 6/16/10. (rje, ) (Entered: 06/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1419 Filed: 6/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Case randomly reassigned to Judge Richard J. Leon. Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth no longer assigned to the case. (gt, ) (Entered: 06/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1418 Filed: 6/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 1361 Motion for Recusal and denying as moot 1374 Motion for Discovery. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 6/16/10. (rje, ) (Entered: 06/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 1417 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT filed by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1416 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE Of Filing Memorandum Of Understanding Regarding Access To Classified National Security Information By Vicki Werneke by NADIR OMAR ABDULLAH BIN SA'ADO ALS'AARY re (573 in 1:09-cv-00745-RCL, 409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Order (Bryan, Edward) (Entered: 06/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1415 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing Under Seal (ISN 326) by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Simmons, Keith) (Entered: 06/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1414 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 1404 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply To Request for Additional Discovery by ABDUL RAZAK ALI (Gorman, H.) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1413 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION to File a Consolidated Reply and for an Extension of Time to Reply to the Responses of Petitioners and Press Intervenors by BARACK H. OBAMA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marcus, Lisa) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1412 Filed: 5/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing Under Seal (ISN 684) by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Matheny, Steve) (Entered: 05/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1410 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Reschedule Status Conference by SHARQAWI ABDU ALI-AL HAAG (Maher, Patricia) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 1409 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT filed by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1408 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Continue Deadline of Filing Consolidated Response to Respondents Motion to Amend and for Clarification of the Courts January 14, 2010 Order Regarding Public Returns by MUHAMMED RAHIM, HAJJI NASSIM, MUSTAFA FARAJ MOHAMMAD, ABDUL GHANI, NASHWAN AL-RAMER ABDULRAZZAQ, MOHAMMED NAZIR BIN LEP, MOHAMMED HASHIM, MAKHTAR YAHIA NAJI AL-WRAFIE, ABDUL HAFIZ, AHMED ADNAN AHJAM, MOHAMMED AHMED SLAM AL-KHATEEB, ABDUL RAZAK ALI, SHARQAWI ABDU ALI-AL HAAG, NADIR OMAR ABDULLAH BIN SA'ADO ALS'AARY, ABDURAHMAN LNU, EDRESS LNU, SHARGOWI LNU, MOHAMMED ABDULLAH TAHA MATTAN, ABU RAWDA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Proposed Order)(Thompson, Darin) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1407 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Simmons, Keith) (Entered: 04/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1406 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 1404 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply To Request for Additional Discovery by ABDUL RAZAK ALI (Gorman, H.) (Entered: 04/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1405 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to SHARQAWI ABDU ALI-AL HAAG. Attorney Sara J. Toering terminated. (Toering, Sara) (Entered: 04/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1404 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply To Request for Additional Discovery by ABDUL RAZAK ALI (Gorman, H.) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1403 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to opposition to motion re 1374 MOTION for Discovery regarding Governments ex parte Communication with this Court filed by ABDUL RAZAK ALI (Gorman, H.) Modified on 4/16/2010 to add correct event (rdj). (Entered: 04/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1402 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER requiring respondents to produce the douments identified in open court within 21 days of this Order and directing respondents to conduct an additional search for exculpatory information. A further status shall be held on May 14, 2010, at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 4/15/2010. (lcrcl2, ) (Entered: 04/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1401 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE Of Filing -- Respondents Motion To Amend And For Clarification Of The Courts January 14, 2010 Order Regarding Public Returns by BARACK OBAMA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 04/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 1400 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT re 1399 Notice (Other) filed by JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, BARACK OBAMA, MIKE BUMGARNER. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zdr) (Entered: 04/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1399 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing Under Seal (ISN 684) by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Matheny, Steve) (Entered: 04/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 1398 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED MEMORANDUM & ORDER granting re 1360 SEALED MOTION filed by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. FURTHER ORDERED MOTION 1382 to extend filing deadline for petitioner's traverse is DENIED as moot. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) filed by JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, BARACK OBAMA, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER.(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 3/30/10.(zrje) Modified on 4/6/2010 (zrje, ). (Entered: 04/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1397 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE Of Filing Memorandum Of Understanding Regarding Access To Classified National Security Information By Rhonda Huczel by NADIR OMAR ABDULLAH BIN SA'ADO ALS'AARY re (573 in 1:09-cv-00745-RCL, 409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Order (Bryan, Edward) (Entered: 03/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1396 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE Of Filing Memorandum Of Understanding Regarding Access To Classified National Security Information by NADIR OMAR ABDULLAH BIN SA'ADO ALS'AARY re (573 in 1:09-cv-00745-RCL, 409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Order (Hart, Andy) (Entered: 03/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1395 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Andy P. Hart on behalf of NADIR OMAR ABDULLAH BIN SA'ADO ALS'AARY (Hart, Andy) (Entered: 03/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1394 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE Of Filing Memorandum of Understanding Regarding Access To Classified National Security Information by NADIR OMAR ABDULLAH BIN SA'ADO ALS'AARY re (573 in 1:09-cv-00745-RCL, 409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Order (Grill, Donna) (Entered: 03/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1393 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Donna M. Grill on behalf of NADIR OMAR ABDULLAH BIN SA'ADO ALS'AARY (Grill, Donna) (Entered: 03/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1392 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE Of Filing Memorandum Of Understanding Regarding Access To Classified National Security Information by NADIR OMAR ABDULLAH BIN SA'ADO ALS'AARY re (573 in 1:09-cv-00745-RCL, 409 in 1:08-mc-00442-TFH) Order (Bryan, Edward) (Entered: 03/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1391 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Edward G. Bryan on behalf of NADIR OMAR ABDULLAH BIN SA'ADO ALS'AARY (Bryan, Edward) (Entered: 03/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1390 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting David S. Marshall's Motion 1387 to withdraw as attorney for petitioner (ISN 30). The Federal Defender for the Northern District of Ohio is appointed as counsel for petitioner. A lawyer from that office shall file an appearance. Petitioner's traverse is due July 15, 2010. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 3/28/2010. (lcrcl2, ) (Entered: 03/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1389 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in opposition to re 1374 MOTION for Discovery regarding Governments ex parte Communication with this Court filed by BARACK OBAMA. (Hussey, Olivia) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1388 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing Respondents' Opposition to Petitioner's Request for Additional Discovery with CSO by BARACK OBAMA (Hussey, Olivia) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1387 Filed: 3/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Appoint Counsel (& Substitution of Counsel), and to Extend Time to File Traverse by NADIR OMAR ABDULLAH BIN SA'ADO ALS'AARY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order for Appointment and Substitution of Counsel, and to Extend Time to File Traverse)(Marshall, David) (Entered: 03/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1386 Filed: 3/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Concurrence with Petitioner's (ISN 1457) Request to Correct Name on Record by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD re 1385 Notice (Other) (White, David) (Entered: 03/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1385 Filed: 3/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Correction of Petitioner's Name (ISN 1457) by SHARGOWI LNU (Maher, Patricia) (Entered: 03/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1384 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION Regarding Bagram Theater Internment Facility by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER. (Lin, Jean) (Entered: 03/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1383 Filed: 3/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 1374 MOTION for Discovery regarding Governments ex parte Communication with this Court and [undocketed] Motion for Additional Discovery by BARACK OBAMA (Hussey, Olivia) (Entered: 03/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1382 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Petitioner's Traverse by AHMED ADNAN AHJAM (Marshall, David) (Entered: 03/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1381 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER requiring respondents to produce additional discovery with respect to ISN 1457. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 3/15/2010. (lcrcl2, ) (Entered: 03/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1380 Filed: 3/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Olivia Hussey on behalf of BARACK OBAMA (Hussey, Olivia) (Entered: 03/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1379 Filed: 3/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Petitioner's Request for Additional Discovery by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Safavi, Nancy) (Entered: 03/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1378 Filed: 3/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to opposition to motion re 1369 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Respondents' Motion for Judgment on the Record for ISN 685 filed by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (Safavi, Nancy) (Entered: 03/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 1377 Filed: 3/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED STATUS REPORT filed by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf, ) (Entered: 03/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1376 Filed: 3/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing Under Seal (ISN 684) by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Matheny, Steve) (Entered: 03/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1375 Filed: 3/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in opposition to re 1369 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Respondents' Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by ABDUL RAZAK ALI. (Gorman, H.) (Entered: 03/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1374 Filed: 3/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Discovery regarding Governments ex parte Communication with this Court by ABDUL RAZAK ALI (Gorman, H.) (Entered: 03/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 1373 Filed: 2/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT re 1371 Notice (Other) filed by JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, BARACK OBAMA, GEORGE W. BUSH, MIKE BUMGARNER. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zdr) (Entered: 02/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1372 Filed: 2/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to opposition to motion re 1361 MOTION for Recusal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455 (a) filed by ABDUL RAZAK ALI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Gorman, H.) (Entered: 02/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1371 Filed: 2/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Simmons, Keith) (Entered: 02/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1370 Filed: 2/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum in opposition to re 1361 MOTION for Recusal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455 (a) filed by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (Safavi, Nancy) (Entered: 02/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1369 Filed: 2/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Respondents' Motion for Judgment on the Record by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Safavi, Nancy) (Entered: 02/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1368 Filed: 2/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing Declaration of Petitioner by SHARGOWI LNU (Maher, Patricia) (Entered: 02/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1367 Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting respondents' Motion 1366 for Extension of Time. Respondents shall have until February 22, 2010 to respond to petitioner's motion for recusal. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 2/16/2010. (lcrcl2, ) (Entered: 02/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1366 Filed: 2/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Petitioner's Motion for Recusal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 455(a) by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Safavi, Nancy) (Entered: 02/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 1365 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT filed by AHMED ADNAN AHJAM. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 02/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1364 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing Under Seal re Petitioner's Opposition to Respondents' Motion for a Stay of Proceedings by AHMED ADNAN AHJAM (Marshall, David) (Entered: 02/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 1363 Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT filed by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj) (Entered: 02/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1362 Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing Under Seal (ISN 684) by MIKE BUMGARNER, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Matheny, Steve) (Entered: 02/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1361 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Recusal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455 (a) by ABDUL RAZAK ALI (Gorman, H.) (Entered: 01/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 1360 Filed: 1/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED MOTION filed by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(zrdj) (Entered: 01/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1359 Filed: 1/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing Under Seal by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Simmons, Keith) (Entered: 01/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1358 Filed: 1/21/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Address by John A. Chandler (Chandler, John) (Entered: 01/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1357 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to file Respondents' Motion for Judgment on the Record by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Safavi, Nancy) (Entered: 01/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1356 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of classified filing of Memorandum Explaining Designation of Protected Information in Proposed Public Factual Return for ISN 685 by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, BARACK OBAMA, DONALD RUMSFELD (Safavi, Nancy) (Entered: 01/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 675 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?