LAZARIDIS et al v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:09-cv-01177
District Judge Rosemary M. Collyer, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Emmanuel N. Lazaridis, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by LAZARIDIS-KORTJIDAKIS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space EMMANUEL N. LAZARIDIS +30 693 902 7351

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Judith A. Kidwell +1 202 514 7250 +1 202 307 2304 judith.a.kidwell@usdoj.gov
No Logo V.L., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by LAZARIDIS-KORTJIDAKIS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space V.L. +30 693 902 7351
v.
No Logo INTERNATIONAL CENTRE FOR MISSING AND EXPLOITED CHILDREN, Defendant
No Logo National Center For Missing And Exploited Children, Defendant
United States Department of Justice United States Department of Justice, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Judith A. Kidwell +1 202 514 7250 +1 202 307 2304 judith.a.kidwell@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 552
Nature of Suit 895 - Freedom of Information Act
  Entries (57) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 77 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 2/2/2012. (KD)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/18/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
    Memorandum in opposition to re 48 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment As To INTERPOL-U.S. National Central Bureau filed by EMMANUEL N. LAZARIDIS. "Let this be file", by Judge RM Collyer. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of EMMANUEL N. LAZARIDIS, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(rdj) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/18/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
      Memorandum in opposition to re 46 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment As To The Executive Office For U.S. Attorneys filed by EMMANUEL N. LAZARIDIS. "Let this be filed", by Judge RM Collyer. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of EMMANUEL N. LAZARIDIS, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(rdj) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: None
        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 11/22/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: None
          MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 47 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment As To The Federal Bureau of Investigation by EMMANUEL N. LAZARIDIS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Proposed Opposition)(rdj) (Entered: 11/17/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: None
            MOTION to Accept Out-of-Time Pleadings by EMMANUEL N. LAZARIDIS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(rdj) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 46 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment As To The Executive Office For U.S. Attorneys, 48 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment As To INTERPOL-U.S. National Central Bureau, 47 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment As To The Federal Bureau of Investigation by EMMANUEL N. LAZARIDIS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A & B, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(rdj) (Entered: 10/14/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: None
                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 46 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment As To The Executive Office For U.S. Attorneys, 48 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment As To INTERPOL-U.S. National Central Bureau, 47 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment As To The Federal Bureau of Investigation by EMMANUEL N. LAZARIDIS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(rdj) (Entered: 09/28/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER advising Plaintiff to respond to the Department of Justice's three 46 47 48 Motions for Partial Summary Judgement, or the Court may deem those matters as conceded. Plaintiff shall file his response to the United States' motions for partial summary judgment no later than September 30, 2010. If Plaintiff does not respond by that date, the Court will treat the motions as conceded and may enter judgement accordingly. See attached Order for further details. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 7/22/10. (lcrmc1) (Entered: 07/22/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank 48 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: None
                    MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment As To INTERPOL-U.S. National Central Bureau by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Tanaka Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A-J)(Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 07/20/2010)
                      LREF
                      Blank 47 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: None
                      MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment As To The Federal Bureau of Investigation by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration David M. Hardy, # 2 Exhibit A-R, # 3 Exhibit T, # 4 Exhibit U, # 5 Exhibit S, # 6 Exhibit S, # 7 Exhibit S, # 8 Exhibit S, # 9 Exhibit S, # 10 Exhibit S, # 11 Exhibit S, # 12 Exhibit S, # 13 Exhibit S, # 14 Exhibit S, # 15 Exhibit S, # 16 Exhibit S, # 17 Exhibit S, # 18 Exhibit S)(Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 07/20/2010)
                        LREF
                        Blank 46 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: None
                        MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment As To The Executive Office For U.S. Attorneys by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Sterns, # 2 Exhibit A-J)(Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 07/20/2010)
                          LREF
                          Blank 45 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: None
                          REPLY to opposition to motion re 42 MOTION for Reconsideration re 39 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by EMMANUEL N. LAZARIDIS. (dr) (Entered: 07/20/2010)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/16/2010, Entered: None
                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 07/16/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank 43 Filed: 7/8/2010, Entered: None
                              Memorandum in opposition to re 42 MOTION for Reconsideration re 39 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,, filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 07/08/2010)
                                LREF
                                Blank 42 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None
                                MOTION for Reconsideration re 39 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment by EMMANUEL N. LAZARIDIS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(rdj) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None
                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/24/2010, Entered: None
                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 06/24/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER granting 18 Motion to Dismiss by National Center for Missing and Exploited Children and International Center for Missing and Exploited Children; granting in part and denying in part 27 Motion to Dismiss by U.S. Department of Justice; and denying 30 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. See accompanying Memorandum Opinion for details. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 5/26/10. (lcrmc1) (Entered: 05/26/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 5/26/10. (lcrmc1) (Entered: 05/26/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: None
                                          REPLY to opposition to motion re 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by EMMANUEL N. LAZARIDIS. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Exhibit A)(rdj) (Entered: 12/15/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/16/2009, Entered: None
                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment by EMMANUEL N. LAZARIDIS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(rdj) (Entered: 11/18/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/17/2009, Entered: None
                                              Memorandum in opposition to re 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Declaration Hardy Declaration, # 3 Exhibit FBI Exhibits, # 4 Declaration Interpol, # 5 Exhibit Interpol Exhibits)(Kidwell, Judith) Modified on 6/24/2010 to seal the attachments which contain confidential information (jeb, ). (Entered: 11/17/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                Memorandum in opposition to re 33 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Cross Motion for Summary Judgment filed by EMMANUEL N. LAZARIDIS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(rdj) (Entered: 11/12/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Cross Motion for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 10/26/2009)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                    REPLY to opposition to motion re 27 MOTION to Dismiss filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 10/20/2009)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                      Memorandum in opposition to re 27 MOTION to Dismiss filed by EMMANUEL N. LAZARIDIS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(rdj) (Entered: 10/20/2009)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                        Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment on Claims 1 and 2 by EMMANUEL N. LAZARIDIS (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(rdj) (Entered: 10/20/2009)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          Order advising plaintiff to respond or Court may deem matter as conceded. Plaintiff shall file his response to the United States' motion to dismiss no later than November 19, 2009. If Plaintiff does not respond by that date, the Court may treat the motion as conceded and dismiss the complaint against the movant. See attached Order for further details. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 10/8/09. (lcrmc1) (Entered: 10/08/2009)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE of Filing of Certificate of Service re 27 by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Kidwell, Judith) Modified on 10/6/2009 to add linkage (rdj). (Entered: 10/05/2009)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                              MOTION to Dismiss by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 10/05/2009)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                REPLY to opposition to motion re 18 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by NATIONAL CENTER FOR MISSING & EXPLOITED CHILDREN, INTERNATIONAL CENTRE FOR MISSING AND EXPLOITED CHILDREN. (Kerr, David) (Entered: 09/30/2009)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                  Memorandum in opposition to re 18 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by EMMANUEL N. LAZARIDIS. (rdj) (Entered: 09/24/2009)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                    REPLY to opposition to motion re 11 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by EMMANUEL N. LAZARIDIS. (rdj) (Entered: 09/24/2009)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/23/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER GRANTING 17 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Reply, 20 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time, and 22 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Opposition, and DENYING 21 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. See attached Order for further details. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 9/23/09. (lcrmc1) (Entered: 09/23/2009)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Response in Opposition by EMMANUEL N. LAZARIDIS (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Response in Opposition, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(rdj) (Entered: 09/23/2009)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                          MOTION for Reconsideration re 15 Order on Motion for TRO by EMMANUEL N. LAZARIDIS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(rdj) (Entered: 09/23/2009)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 18 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by EMMANUEL N. LAZARIDIS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(rdj) (Entered: 09/23/2009)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/10/2009, Entered: 9/10/2009 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                              Memorandum in opposition to re 17 MOTION for Leave to File filed by NATIONAL CENTER FOR MISSING & EXPLOITED CHILDREN, INTERNATIONAL CENTRE FOR MISSING AND EXPLOITED CHILDREN. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kerr, David) (Entered: 09/10/2009)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/4/2009, Entered: 9/4/2009 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by NATIONAL CENTER FOR MISSING & EXPLOITED CHILDREN, INTERNATIONAL CENTRE FOR MISSING AND EXPLOITED CHILDREN (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)(Kerr, David) (Entered: 09/04/2009)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/1/2009, Entered: 9/4/2009 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief by EMMANUEL N. LAZARIDIS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Reply to Memorandum, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(rdj) (Entered: 09/04/2009)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/3/2009, Entered: 9/3/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Or Other Response by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 09/03/2009)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/27/2009, Entered: 8/27/2009 Order on Motion for TROCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER denying 11 Motion for TRO. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 8/27/09. (lcrmc1, ) (Entered: 08/27/2009)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/24/2009, Entered: 8/24/2009 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Kidwell on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 08/24/2009)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/18/2009, Entered: 8/18/2009 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                          Memorandum in opposition to re 11 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by NATIONAL CENTER FOR MISSING & EXPLOITED CHILDREN, INTERNATIONAL CENTRE FOR MISSING AND EXPLOITED CHILDREN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-3)(Kerr, David) (Entered: 08/18/2009)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/17/2009, Entered: 8/18/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                            NOTICE of Certificate of Service by EMMANUEL N. LAZARIDIS re 11 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (rdj) (Entered: 08/18/2009)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/13/2009, Entered: 8/13/2009 Motion for TROCourt Filing
                                                                                              MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by EMMANUEL N. LAZARIDIS (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order) "Leave to file GRANTED", signed by Judge R.M. Collyer (rdj) (Entered: 08/13/2009)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/11/2009, Entered: 8/11/2009 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney for DC
                                                                                                RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney, served on 8/4/2009, answer due 9/3/2009. (jf, ) (Entered: 08/11/2009)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/31/2009, Entered: 7/31/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by NATIONAL CENTER FOR MISSING & EXPLOITED CHILDREN, INTERNATIONAL CENTRE FOR MISSING AND EXPLOITED CHILDREN (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kerr, David) (Entered: 07/31/2009)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/31/2009, Entered: 7/31/2009 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Kerr on behalf of NATIONAL CENTER FOR MISSING & EXPLOITED CHILDREN, INTERNATIONAL CENTRE FOR MISSING AND EXPLOITED CHILDREN (Kerr, David) (Entered: 07/31/2009)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/27/2009, Entered: 7/27/2009 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
                                                                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General July 7, 2009. (rdj) (Entered: 07/27/2009)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/27/2009, Entered: 7/27/2009 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA case
                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by EMMANUEL N. LAZARIDIS. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 7/7/2009, answer due 8/6/2009. (rdj) (Entered: 07/27/2009)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/10/2009, Entered: 7/13/2009 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA case
                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by EMMANUEL N. LAZARIDIS. NATIONAL CENTER FOR MISSING & EXPLOITED CHILDREN served on 7/2/2009, answer due 8/3/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Track & Confirm from USPS.com)(rdj) (Entered: 07/13/2009)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/10/2009, Entered: 7/13/2009 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA case
                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by EMMANUEL N. LAZARIDIS. INTERNATIONAL CENTRE FOR MISSING AND EXPLOITED CHILDREN served on 7/6/2009, answer due 8/5/2009. (rdj) (Entered: 07/13/2009)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/26/2009, Entered: 6/30/2009 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperisCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; further ordered, pro se complaint is construed under the FOIA, 5 U.S.C. 552(a)(4)(B). Directing the Clerk to open a new case and file the complaint. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 06/24/09. (jf, ) (SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAIL(S) ) (jf) (Entered: 06/30/2009)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/26/2009, Entered: 6/30/2009 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by EMMANUEL N. LAZARIDIS (jf, ) (Entered: 06/30/2009)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/26/2009, Entered: 6/30/2009 Complaint
                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, NATIONAL CENTER FOR MISSING & EXPLOITED CHILDREN, INTERNATIONAL CENTRE FOR MISSING AND EXPLOITED CHILDREN (Filing fee $ 0.00) filed by EMMANUEL N. LAZARIDIS, V.L.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jf, ) (Entered: 06/30/2009)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 123 times.

                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?