HAMIDULLAH et al v. OBAMA et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:10-cv-00758
District Judge John D. Bates, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo HAMIDULLAH, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Zuckerman Spaeder LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John J. Connolly +1 410 332 0444 +1 410 659 0436 jconnolly@zuckerman.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William James Murphy +1 410 332 0444 +1 410 659 0436 wmurphy@zuckerman.com
No Logo WAKEEL KHAN, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Zuckerman Spaeder LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John J. Connolly +1 410 332 0444 +1 410 659 0436 jconnolly@zuckerman.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William James Murphy +1 410 332 0444 +1 410 659 0436 wmurphy@zuckerman.com
v.
Obama, Barack Hussein Obama, Barack Hussein, Respondent
Officially listed as "BARACK OBAMA"
United States of America President, United States of America, January 20, 2009 - January 20, 2017

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo JACK L. BRIGGS, II, Respondent

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo JOHN AND/OR JANE DOES NOS. 1-5, Respondent

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Gates, Robert M. Gates, Robert M., Respondent
Officially listed as "ROBERT M. GATES"
Nacco Industries, Inc. Unknown Role, Nacco Industries, Inc.
Starbucks Corporation Unknown Role, Starbucks Corporation

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2241
Nature of Suit 530 - Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 25 Filed: 2/6/2012, Entered: 2/6/2012 ~Notice (other)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: 1/13/2012 ~Notice (other)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: 9/28/2011 Sealed Document +
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/5/2011, Entered: 4/6/2011 Supplemental Memorandum
        SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (same filing as Response to Order to Show Cause docket # 10), filed by JACK L. BRIGGS, II, ROBERT M. GATES, JOHN AND/OR JANE DOES NOS. 1-5, BARACK OBAMA. (See Docket Entry 20 to view document). (dr) (Entered: 04/06/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 21 Filed: 3/31/2011, Entered: 4/6/2011 Supplemental Memorandum
          SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM (Exhibit 40) to re 13 Memorandum in Opposition, filed by HAMIDULLAH, WAKEEL KHAN. (dr) (Entered: 04/06/2011)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/5/2011, Entered: 4/5/2011 Motion for Leave to File
            Consent MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum In Support of Respondents' Motion to Dismiss AND Supplemental Memorandum by JACK L. BRIGGS, II, ROBERT M. GATES, JOHN AND/OR JANE DOES NOS. 1-5, BARACK OBAMA (Lin, Jean) (Entered: 04/05/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 19 Filed: 3/31/2011, Entered: 3/31/2011 Motion for Leave to File
              MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to Opposition to Respondents' Motion to Dismiss by HAMIDULLAH, WAKEEL KHAN (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 40. Declaration of D. Eviatar (from 10-758))(Connolly, John) (Entered: 03/31/2011)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: 2/25/2011 Notice of Change of Address
                NOTICE of Change of Address by John J. Connolly (Connolly, John) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: 2/14/2011 Reply to opposition to Motion
                  REPLY to opposition to motion re 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (same filing as Response to Order to Show Cause docket # 10) , filed by JACK L. BRIGGS, II, ROBERT M. GATES, JOHN AND/OR JANE DOES NOS. 1-5, BARACK OBAMA. (Lin, Jean) Modified on 2/15/2011 to edit text (dr). (Entered: 02/14/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: 1/20/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (same filing as Response to Order to Show Cause docket # 10) by JACK L. BRIGGS, II, ROBERT M. GATES, JOHN AND/OR JANE DOES NOS. 1-5, BARACK OBAMA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lin, Jean) Modified on 2/15/2011 to edit text (dr). (Entered: 01/20/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: 1/20/2011 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT
                      NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT to 13 Memorandum in Opposition,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by HAMIDULLAH, WAKEEL KHAN (The original PDF Document contained privacy information and was restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 12. Redacted Noon Declaration and Leaving Certificate)(Connolly, John) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: 1/18/2011 Motion for Leave to File
                        Consent MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal by HAMIDULLAH, WAKEEL KHAN (Connolly, John) (LODGED UNDER SEAL) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/17/2011, Entered: 1/17/2011 Memorandum in Opposition
                          Memorandum in opposition to re 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (same filing as Response to Order to Show Cause docket # 10) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (same filing as Response to Order to Show Cause docket # 10) (Redacted) filed by HAMIDULLAH, WAKEEL KHAN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1. Time, The Truth About Afghanistan (Mar. 22, 2007), # 2 Exhibit 2. Wikipedia, The War in Northwest Pakistan, # 3 Exhibit 3. Al Jazeera, Abducted Pakistani elders killed (June 25, 2008), # 4 Exhibit 4. The Long War Journal, Six Killed in strike in South Waziristan (July 28, 2008), # 5 Exhibit 5. The Long War Journal, Five Killed in al Qaeda safe house strike in South Waziristan (Aug. 31, 2008), # 6 Exhibit 6. AP, Pakistani Army Says 60 Suspected Militants Killed (Sep. 23, 2008), # 7 Exhibit 7. UNHCR, Return of Displaced to Pakistans South Waziristan to start next month (Nov. 12, 2010), # 8 Exhibit 8. Bagram Detainee List, # 9 Exhibit 9. S. Braude et al., Accuracy of bone assessments for verifying age in adolescents application in sport, S. AFR. J. RADIOLOGY, at 4 (June 2007), # 10 Exhibit 10. Z. Zadik, Age and Bone Age Determinations Inaccurate Methods at Their Best, 22 J. PEDIATRIC ENDOCRINOLOGY & METABOLISM 479 (2009), # 11 Exhibit 11. Samurai Radiologist (blog), Bone Scans and DNA Testing by Major League Baseball (July 24, 2009), # 12 Exhibit 12. Noon Declaration and Leaving Certificate (redacted), # 13 Exhibit 13. Pakistans Consolidated Third and Fourth Periodic Report to the UN Committee on the Rights of the Child (excerpted), # 14 Exhibit 14. Rules for Pakistan Civil Service Examination, # 15 Exhibit 15. Wikipedia, Education in Pakistan, # 16 Exhibit 16. Sunday Times, Bagram Prison in Afghanistan may become the new Guantanamo, (Mar. 22, 2010), # 17 Exhibit 17. Los Angeles Times, U.S. hopes to share prison with Afghanistan (June 9, 2010), # 18 Exhibit 18. National Security Strategy (excerpt) (May 2010), # 19 Exhibit 19. Washington Post, Indefinite detention possible for suspects at Guantanamo Bay (Dec. 22, 2010), # 20 Exhibit 20. Memorandum to the General Counsel, Dept. of Defense (Dec. 28, 2001), # 21 Exhibit 21. Declaration of Col. L. Wilkerson in Hamad v. Bush, # 22 Exhibit 22. Miami Herald Guantanamo statistics (Jan. 6, 2011), # 23 Exhibit 23. New York Times, Foiling US Plan, Prison Expands in Afghanistan (Jan. 7, 2008), # 24 Exhibit 24. Wall Street Journal, U.S. Set to Open New Afghan Prison (Nov. 17, 2009), # 25 Exhibit 25. New York Times, A Court, A Verdict, A First for Afghans (July 18, 2010), # 26 Exhibit 26. BBC, Bush admits to CIA secret prisons (Sep. 7, 2006), # 27 Exhibit 27. New York Times, Afghans Detail Detention in Black Jail at U.S. Base (Nov. 29, 2009), # 28 Exhibit 28. NPR, U.S. Gen. Urges Release Of Bagrams Detainees (Aug. 20, 2009), # 29 Exhibit 28a. USA Today, How the U.S. reshaped an Afghan prisons image (Aug. 5, 2010), # 30 Exhibit 29. Los Angeles Times, Hidden Justice (Oct. 19, 2010), # 31 Exhibit 30. The Paris Commitments, # 32 Exhibit 31. The Paris Commitments -- Endorsements, # 33 Exhibit 32. The Paris Principles, # 34 Exhibit 33. The Rome Statute of the International Criminal Court, # 35 Exhibit 34. Guantanamos children, # 36 Exhibit 35. C. Spaminato, Skeletal Bone Age Assessment, # 37 Exhibit 36. UN Security Council Resolution 1612 (July 26, 2005), # 38 Exhibit 37. UN Security Council Resolution 1539 (April 22, 2004), # 39 Exhibit 38. R. Coomarswamy, The Optional Protocol to the Convention on the Rights of the Child, 18 INTL J. CHILDRENS RIGHTS 535 (2010))(Connolly, John) (Entered: 01/17/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: 12/22/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (same filing as Response to Order to Show Cause docket # 10) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (same filing as Response to Order to Show Cause docket # 10) by HAMIDULLAH, WAKEEL KHAN (Connolly, John) (Entered: 12/22/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: 12/17/2010 Motion to Dismiss
                              MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (same filing as Response to Order to Show Cause docket # 10) by JACK L. BRIGGS, II, ROBERT M. GATES, JOHN AND/OR JANE DOES NOS. 1-5, BARACK OBAMA (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of William K. Lietzau, # 2 Declaration of Robert S. Harward)(Lin, Jean) (Entered: 12/17/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: 12/17/2010 Response to Order to Show Cause
                                RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by JACK L. BRIGGS, II, ROBERT M. GATES, JOHN AND/OR JANE DOES NOS. 1-5, BARACK OBAMA re 6 Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause (same filing as RESPONDENTS' MOTION TO DISMISS). (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of William K. Lietzau, # 2 Declaration of Robert S. Harward)(Lin, Jean) (Entered: 12/17/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: 12/17/2010 Notice of Appearance/
                                  NOTICE of Appearance by John Russell Tyler on behalf of All Defendants (Tyler, John) (Entered: 12/17/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Blank 8 Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: 11/18/2010 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
                                    AMENDED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by HAMIDULLAH, WAKEEL KHAN.(znmw, ) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: 11/8/2010 Notice of Appearance/
                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Jean Lin on behalf of JACK L. BRIGGS, II, ROBERT M. GATES, JOHN AND/OR JANE DOES NOS. 1-5, BARACK OBAMA (Lin, Jean) (Entered: 11/08/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/5/2010, Entered: 11/5/2010 Order on Motion for Order to Show CauseCourt Filing
                                        ORDER granting 4 petitioner's motion for order to show cause. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 11/5/2010. (lcjdb2) (Entered: 11/05/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/25/2010, Entered: 10/26/2010 ~Motion for Order to Show Cause
                                          MOTION for Order to Show Cause by HAMIDULLAH, WAKEEL KHAN (See Docket Entry 4 to view Document). (dr) (Entered: 10/26/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/25/2010, Entered: 10/25/2010 Status Report
                                            STATUS REPORT and Motion for Order to Show Cause by HAMIDULLAH, WAKEEL KHAN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Delivery Receipts, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Show Cause)(Connolly, John) (Entered: 10/25/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/21/2010, Entered: 10/21/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER regarding service of process status report to be filed by not later than October 28, 2010. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 10/21/2010. (lcjdb2) (Entered: 10/21/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/19/2010, Entered: 5/19/2010 Notice of Appearance/
                                                NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Connolly on behalf of HAMIDULLAH, WAKEEL KHAN (Connolly, John) (Entered: 05/19/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: 5/12/2010 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
                                                  PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 4616029611.) filed by HAMIDULLAH, WAKEEL KHAN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(rdj) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 150 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?