STATE OF GEORGIA v. HOLDER
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:10-cv-01970
District Judge Emmet G. Sullivan, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo State of Georgia, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Strickland Brockington Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne W. Lewis +1 678 347 2200 +1 678 347 2210 awl@sbllaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frank B. Strickland +1 678 347 2200 +1 678 347 2210 fbs@sbllaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan Tyson +1 678 347 2200 bpt@sbllaw.net
v.
Holder, Jr., Eric H. Holder, Jr., Eric H., Defendant
Officially listed as "ERIC H. HOLDER, JR."

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian F. Heffernan +1 202 514 4738
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1973
Nature of Suit 441 - Civil Rights: Voting
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/31/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by STATE OF GEORGIA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Preclearance Letter)(Lewis, Anne) (Entered: 03/31/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: None
    Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by ERIC H. HOLDER, JR (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Heffernan, Brian) (Entered: 03/23/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: None
      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by ERIC H. HOLDER, JR (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Heffernan, Brian) (Entered: 02/18/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/4/2011, Entered: None
        RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney. Date of Service Upon U.S. Attorney 12/22/2010. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/20/2011. (Tyson, Bryan) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/4/2011, Entered: None
          RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 12/22/2010. (Tyson, Bryan) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/30/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
            USCA ORDER filed in USCA on November 29, 2010 FOR DESIGNATION OF JUDGES TO SERVE ON THREE-JUDGE DISTRICT COURT; designating Judge Douglas H. Ginsburg, Judge Emmet G. Sullivan, and Judge Ricardo M. Urbina to hear and determine this case. The U.S. Circuit Court Judge to preside over this case. (ds) (Entered: 11/30/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: None
              NOTICE of Appearance by Frank B. Strickland on behalf of STATE OF GEORGIA (Strickland, Frank) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: None
                NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan Tyson on behalf of STATE OF GEORGIA (Tyson, Bryan) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/18/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER granting 2 Plaintiff's Motion for a Three-Judge Court to adjudicate the claims of this case.. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 11/17/10. (clv, ) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                    MOTION for Three-Judge Court by STATE OF GEORGIA. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(jf, ) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 1 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: None
                      COMPLAINT against ERIC H. HOLDER, JR ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616034248) filed by STATE OF GEORGIA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Civil Cover Sheet)(jf, ) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
                        LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 99 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?