STATE OF GEORGIA v. HOLDER
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:11-cv-01788
District Judge Reggie B. Walton, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo State of Georgia, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Georgia Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel Scott Olens +1 404 656 3300 +1 404 657 8733 solens@law.ga.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Strickland Brockington Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne W. Lewis +1 678 347 2200 +1 678 347 2210 awl@sbllaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frank B. Strickland +1 678 347 2200 +1 678 347 2210 fbs@sbllaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan Tyson +1 678 347 2200 bpt@sbllaw.net
v.
Holder, Jr., Eric H. Holder, Jr., Eric H., Defendant
Officially listed as "ERIC H. HOLDER, JR."

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Abel Gomez +1 202 305 1582 abel.gomez@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Howard Wright steven.wright@usdoj.gov
No Logo CEE CEE ANDERSON, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Arthur B. Spitzer +2024 570 800 x113 +1 202 452 1868 artspitzer@aol.com
No Logo COALITION FOR THE PEOPLES AGENDA, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Arthur B. Spitzer +2024 570 800 x113 +1 202 452 1868 artspitzer@aol.com
No Logo DIANE B. EVANS, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan Lovells US LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patricia A. Brannan +1 202 637 8686 +1 202 637 5910 patricia.brannan@hoganlovells.com
No Logo FRANCYS JOHNSON, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan, Lovells Law Firm - NY Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patricia A. Brannan +1 202 637 8686 +1 202 637 5910 patricia.brannan@hoganlovells.com
No Logo GEORGIA ASSOCIATION OF LATINO ELECTED OFFICIALS, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Kent Tanner +1 202 503 7696 john.k.tanner@gmail.com
No Logo GEORGIA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Arthur B. Spitzer +2024 570 800 x113 +1 202 452 1868 artspitzer@aol.com
No Logo JAMES QUARTERMAN, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Arthur B. Spitzer +2024 570 800 x113 +1 202 452 1868 artspitzer@aol.com
No Logo KRISTA BREWER, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Arthur B. Spitzer +2024 570 800 x113 +1 202 452 1868 artspitzer@aol.com
No Logo LEAGUE OF UNITED LATIN AMERICAN CITIZENS, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Kent Tanner +1 202 503 7696 john.k.tanner@gmail.com
No Logo LEGISLATIVE BLACK CAUCUS OF THE GEORGIA GENERAL ASSEMBLY, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Kent Tanner +1 202 503 7696 john.k.tanner@gmail.com
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1973
Nature of Suit 441 - Civil Rights: Voting
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/27/2011, Entered: None
RESPONSE re 11 MOTION to Intervene, 12 MOTION to Intervene, 17 MOTION to Intervene, filed by ERIC H. HOLDER, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Unpublished Orders)(Wright, Steven) Modified on 12/28/2011 to edit event and linked relationships. (dr). (Entered: 12/27/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/27/2011, Entered: None
    NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Howard Wright on behalf of ERIC H. HOLDER, JR (Wright, Steven) (Entered: 12/27/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/23/2011, Entered: None
      RESPONSE re 18 MOTION to Dismiss filed by STATE OF GEORGIA; (See docket entry no. 19 to view document) (td, ) (Entered: 12/27/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/27/2011, Entered: None
        Memorandum in opposition to re 11 MOTION to Intervene, 17 MOTION to Intervene, 12 MOTION to Intervene filed by STATE OF GEORGIA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Lewis, Anne) (Entered: 12/27/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/23/2011, Entered: None
          NOTICE of No Opposition by STATE OF GEORGIA re 18 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter Preclearing Redistricting Plans)(Lewis, Anne) (Entered: 12/23/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/23/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
            MOTION to Dismiss by ERIC H. HOLDER, JR (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gomez, Abel) (Entered: 12/23/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/22/2011, Entered: None
              MOTION to Intervene by DIANE B. EVANS, FRANCYS JOHNSON (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(rdj) (Entered: 12/23/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/21/2011, Entered: None
                MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Manoj S. Varghese, :Firm- Bondurant, Mixson & Elmore, :Address- 1201 West Peachtree Street, NW, Suite 3900. Phone No. - 404-881-4100. Fax No. - 404-881-4111 by GEORGIA ASSOCIATION OF LATINO ELECTED OFFICIALS, LEAGUE OF UNITED LATIN AMERICAN CITIZENS, LEGISLATIVE BLACK CAUCUS OF THE GEORGIA GENERAL ASSEMBLY (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Tanner, John) (Entered: 12/21/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/21/2011, Entered: None
                  MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Michael B. Terry, :Firm- Bondurant, Mixson & Elmore, :Address- 1201 West Peachtree Street, NW, Suite 3900. Phone No. - 404-881-4100. Fax No. - 404-881-4111 by GEORGIA ASSOCIATION OF LATINO ELECTED OFFICIALS, LEAGUE OF UNITED LATIN AMERICAN CITIZENS, LEGISLATIVE BLACK CAUCUS OF THE GEORGIA GENERAL ASSEMBLY (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Tanner, John) (Entered: 12/21/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/21/2011, Entered: None
                    MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Emmet J. Bondurant, :Firm- Bondurant, Mixson & Elmore, :Address- 1201 West Peachtree Street, NW, Suite 3900. Phone No. - 404-881-4100. Fax No. - 404-881-4111 by GEORGIA ASSOCIATION OF LATINO ELECTED OFFICIALS, LEAGUE OF UNITED LATIN AMERICAN CITIZENS, LEGISLATIVE BLACK CAUCUS OF THE GEORGIA GENERAL ASSEMBLY (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Tanner, John) (Entered: 12/21/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/15/2011, Entered: None
                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and for the Parties to Respond to the Motion of the Legislative Black Caucus of the Georgia General Assembly, Georgia Association of Latino Elected Officials, and League of United Latin American Citizens to Intervene as Defendants by ERIC H. HOLDER, JR (Gomez, Abel) (Entered: 12/15/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: None
                        MOTION to Intervene by CEE CEE ANDERSON, KRISTA BREWER, JAMES QUARTERMAN, GEORGIA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE, and COALITION FOR THE PEOPLES AGENDA. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Intervene, # 2 Intervenors' Proposed Answer, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Spitzer, Arthur) (Entered: 12/12/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None
                          MOTION to Intervene as Defendants by LEGISLATIVE BLACK CAUCUS OF THE GEORGIA GENERAL ASSEMBLY, GEORGIA ASSOCIATION OF LATINO ELECTED OFFICIALS, LEAGUE OF UNITED LATIN AMERICAN CITIZENS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(znmw, ) (Entered: 12/08/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None
                            RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/24/2011. (Tyson, Bryan) (Entered: 10/28/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/26/2011, Entered: None
                              RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/18/2011. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/17/2011. (Tyson, Bryan) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None
                                NOTICE of Appearance by Abel Gomez on behalf of ERIC H. HOLDER, JR (Gomez, Abel) (Entered: 10/24/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Frank B. Strickland on behalf of STATE OF GEORGIA (Strickland, Frank) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan Tyson on behalf of STATE OF GEORGIA (Tyson, Bryan) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      USCA ORDER filed in USCA on 10/20/2011 FOR DESIGNATION OF JUDGES TO SERVE ON THREE-JUDGE DISTRICT COURT: designating Circuit Judge David S. Tatel and District Judge Beryl A. Howell to hear and determine this case with District Judge Reggie B. Walton. The U.S. Circuit Court Judge to preside over this case. (ds) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: None
                                        ERRATA Regarding Complaint Exhibits by STATE OF GEORGIA 1 Complaint, filed by STATE OF GEORGIA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 10 to Complaint)(Lewis, Anne) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ORDER granting 2 Motion to Convene Three-Judge Court. As expressed in the attached Order, it is hereby ORDERED that the plaintiff's application is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall transmit a copy of this Order to the Chief Judge of the United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 10/14/2011. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 10/14/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            MOTION to Convene Three-Judge Court by STATE OF GEORGIA (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(td, ) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Blank 1 Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: None
                                              COMPLAINT against ERIC H. HOLDER, JR ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616042915) filed by STATE OF GEORGIA. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4 part 1, # 6 Exhibit 4 part 2, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7 part 1, # 10 Exhibit 7 part 2, # 11 Exhibit 8, # 12 Exhibit 9, # 13 Exhibit 10, # 14 Exhibit 11)(td, ) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
                                                LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 233 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?