ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER v. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:02-cv-01233
District Judge John D. Bates, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 25, 2017 at 5:33 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Electronic Privacy Information Center, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Gregory Weaver (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David L. Sobel +1 202 246 6180 +1 202 237 7727 sobel@att.net
v.
United States Department of Defense United States Department of Defense, Defendant
Officially listed as "DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter S. Smith +1 202 514 7065 +1 202 514 8779 peter.smith@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 552
Nature of Suit 895 - Freedom of Information Act
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/14/2003, Entered: None
SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT of Attorney's Fees by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Graham-Oliver, Heather) (Entered: 10/14/2003)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/30/2003, Entered: None
    MANDATE of USCA as to 11 granting the motion to dismiss appeal (USCA #03-5085). Notice of Appeal filed by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (cp, ) (Entered: 06/05/2003)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/14/2003, Entered: None
      NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 9 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, 10 Memorandum & Opinion by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. Filing fee $0 (Government). (nmw, ) (Entered: 03/17/2003)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
        MEMORANDUM AND OPINION granting Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction.Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 1/16/03. (dvb) (Entered: 01/16/2003)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 9 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER granting 3 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 1/16/03. (dvb) (Entered: 01/16/2003)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/13/2002, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Smith, Peter) (Entered: 07/13/2002)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/13/2002, Entered: None
              NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Smith, Peter) (Entered: 07/13/2002)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/12/2002, Entered: None
                REPLY in Support of Motion re 3 for Preliminary Injunction filed by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 9# 2 Exhibit 10# 3 Exhibit 11# 4 Exhibit 12# 5 Exhibit 13)(Sobel, David) (Entered: 07/12/2002)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/9/2002, Entered: None
                  MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion re 3 filed by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F)(Smith, Peter) (Entered: 07/09/2002)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/9/2002, Entered: None
                    ATTORNEY APPEARANCE. (Smith, Peter) (Entered: 07/09/2002)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 3 Filed: 6/25/2002, Entered: None
                      MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in support of motion for preliminary injunction# 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit # 4 Exhibit # 5 Exhibit # 6 Exhibit # 7 Exhibit # 8 Exhibit # 9 Exhibit # 10 Declaration# 11 proposed order# 12 certificate)(cdw, ) (Entered: 07/08/2002)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/21/2002, Entered: None
                        LCvR 26.1 - CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests (aet, ) (Entered: 06/27/2002)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank 1 Filed: 6/21/2002, Entered: None
                          COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE ( Filing fee $150 ). Filed by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (aet, ) (Entered: 06/26/2002)
                            LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 67 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?