KB Toys, Inc.
Bankruptcy Case Delaware Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 12-C-06
District Judge Kevin J. Carey, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 1, 2017 at 1:25 AM EDT (4.3 years ago) SpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Ernst & Young Corporate Finance LLC and Ernst & Young LLP, Creditor Committee

Toggle Switch Represented by Richards, Layton & Finger, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kimberly D. Newmarch +1 302 651 7689 +1 302 498 7689
No Logo Giuliani Capital Advisors LLC, Creditor Committee

Toggle Switch Represented by Richards, Layton & Finger, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kimberly D. Newmarch +1 302 651 7689 +1 302 498 7689
No Logo Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, Creditor Committee

Toggle Switch Represented by Dreier LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul Traub +1 212 351 3770 +1 212 878 8792 ECFNotices@dreierllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rebecca L. Booth +1 215 963 5690 +1 877 432 9652 rbooth@morganlewis.com

Represented by Richards, Layton & Finger, PA

No Logo Richards, Layton & Finger, PA, Creditor Committee

Toggle Switch Represented by Richards, Layton & Finger, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kimberly D. Newmarch +1 302 651 7689 +1 302 498 7689
No Logo Southington/Route 10 Associates Limited Partnership, Creditor Committee

Toggle Switch Represented by Rogin, Nassau, Caplan, Lassman & Hirtle, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barry S. Feigenbaum +1 860 278 7480 +1 860 278 2179 bfeigenbaum@roginlaw.com
No Logo KB Toys, Inc., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alfred Villoch, III +1 302 552 4200 +1 813 347 5161

Toggle Switch Represented by Akerman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Susan Balaschak +1 212 880 3845 +1 212 880 8965 susan.balaschak@akerman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Edwards Wildman Palmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William E. Chipman, Jr. +1 302 777 7770 +1 302 777 7263 wchipman@eapdlaw.com

Represented by Richards, Layton & Finger, PA

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/22/2008 James S. Yoder +1 302 467 4524 +1 302 467 4554 yoderj@whiteandwilliams.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space M. Blake Cleary +1 302 571 6600 +1 302 571 1253 bankfilings@ycst.com
Space Matthew Barry Lunn +1 302 571 6600 mlunn@ycst.com
Space Joseph Anthony Malfitano +1 847 504 3257 jmalfitano@hilcotrading.com
Space Jennifer R. Noel +1 302 571 6600
Space Joel Alan Waite +1 302 571 6600 +1 302 571 0453 jwaite@ycst.com
No Logo Vincent J. Poppiti, Mediator

Toggle Switch Represented by Blank Rome LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Vincent J. Poppiti +1 302 425 6400 poppiti@blankrome.com
Nature of Suit 424 - (Obj/Revocation Discharge 727
  Entries (6160) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6160 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: 12/19/2011 Claims Register
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6159 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: 12/6/2011 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6158 Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: 12/2/2011 Post-Confirmation Report
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6157 Filed: 9/16/2011, Entered: 9/16/2011 Claims Register
        Claims Register in alphabetical and numerical order. Filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 numerical) (JRK) (Entered: 09/16/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6156 Filed: 8/25/2011, Entered: 8/25/2011 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6155 Filed: 8/25/2011, Entered: 8/25/2011 Post-Confirmation Report
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6154 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: 7/7/2011 Claims Register
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6153 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: 6/27/2011 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6152 Filed: 6/14/2011, Entered: 6/14/2011 Post-Confirmation Report
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6151 Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: 4/14/2011 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6150 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: 4/4/2011 Post-Confirmation Report
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6149 Filed: 3/24/2011, Entered: 3/24/2011 Claims Register
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6148 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: 1/20/2011 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6147 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: 1/7/2011 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6146 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: 1/7/2011 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6145 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: 1/6/2011 Order
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6144 Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: 1/5/2011 Post-Confirmation Report
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6143 Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: 1/5/2011 Certification of Counsel
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6142 Filed: 11/11/2010, Entered: 11/11/2010 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6141 Filed: 11/11/2010, Entered: 11/11/2010 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6140 Filed: 11/6/2010, Entered: 11/7/2010 BNC Certificate of Mailing.
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6139 Filed: 11/5/2010, Entered: 11/5/2010 Order
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6138 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: 11/4/2010 Certification of Counsel
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6137 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: 11/4/2010 Transcript
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6136 Filed: 11/2/2010, Entered: 11/2/2010 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6135 Filed: 11/2/2010, Entered: 11/2/2010 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6134 Filed: 11/2/2010, Entered: 11/2/2010 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6133 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: 11/2/2010 Hearing Held/Court Sign-In Sheet
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6132 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: 11/1/2010 Request for Transcript
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6131 Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: 10/29/2010 Order
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6130 Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: 10/29/2010 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6129 Filed: 10/28/2010, Entered: 10/28/2010 Notice of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (B)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6128 Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: 10/26/2010 Certification of Counsel
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6127 Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: 10/26/2010 Notice of Withdrawal (B)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6126 Filed: 10/25/2010, Entered: 10/25/2010 Certification of Counsel
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6125 Filed: 10/22/2010, Entered: 10/22/2010 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6124 Filed: 10/20/2010, Entered: 10/20/2010 Claims Register
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6123 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: 10/18/2010 Notice of Hearing (B)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6122 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: 10/8/2010 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6121 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: 10/7/2010 Post-Confirmation Report
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6120 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: 10/5/2010 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6119 Filed: 10/4/2010, Entered: 10/4/2010 Motion to Allow (B)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6118 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: 7/1/2010 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                      Affidavit of Service of Barbara J. Witters (Notice of Cancellation of Hearing). (related document(s) 6117 ) Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. (Irgens, Andrew) Modified docket text on 7/6/2010 (LMD). (Entered: 07/01/2010)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6117 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: 6/18/2010 Notice of Hearing (B)
                                                                                        Notice of Cancellation of Hearing. Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 6/24/2010 at 03:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (Irgens, Andrew) Modified docket text on 6/21/2010 (LMD). (Entered: 06/18/2010)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6116 Filed: 6/16/2010, Entered: 6/16/2010 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                          Affidavit of Service of Barbara J. Witters re: Quarterly Report of the Residual Trustee for the 1st Quarter of 2010. (related document(s) 6113 ) Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. (Irgens, Andrew) Modified docket text on 6/17/2010 (LMD). (Entered: 06/16/2010)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6115 Filed: 6/16/2010, Entered: 6/16/2010 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                            Affidavit of Service of Barbara J. Witters re: Notice of Amended Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on May 25, 2010 at 3:00 p.m. Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. (Irgens, Andrew) (Entered: 06/16/2010)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6114 Filed: 6/16/2010, Entered: 6/16/2010 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                              Affidavit of Service of Barbara J. Witters re: Notice of Amended Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on May 11, 2010 at 3:30 p.m. Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. (Irgens, Andrew) (Entered: 06/16/2010)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6113 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: 6/14/2010 Post-Confirmation Report
                                                                                                Quarterly Report of the Residual Trustee for the 1st Quarter of 2010. Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. (Irgens, Andrew) Modified docket text on 6/15/2010 (LMD). (Entered: 06/14/2010)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6112 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: 6/5/2010 BNC Certificate of Mailing.
                                                                                                  BNC Certificate of Mailing. (related document(s) 6111 ) Service Date 06/04/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/05/2010)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6111 Filed: 6/2/2010, Entered: 6/2/2010 Transcript
                                                                                                    Transcript regarding Hearing Held 5/25/2010 Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 8/31/2010. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. [For information about how to contact the transcriber, call the Clerk's Office] or [Contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber J&J COURT TRANSCRIBERS, INC., Telephone number (609) 586-2311.] (RE: related document(s) 6104 , 6108 ). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 6/9/2010. Redaction Request Due By 6/23/2010. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 7/6/2010. Transcript access will be restricted through 8/31/2010. (AJL) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6110 Filed: 5/26/2010, Entered: 5/26/2010 Request for Transcript
                                                                                                      Request for Transcript of hearing held on 5/25/2010 received. To obtain a copy of this transcript, contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber J & J Court Transcribing, Telephone number (609)586-2311 (GM) (Entered: 05/26/2010)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6109 Filed: 5/25/2010, Entered: 5/25/2010 Hearing Held/Court Sign-In Sheet
                                                                                                        Hearing Held/Court Sign-In Sheet (related document(s) 6108 ) (LMD) (Entered: 05/25/2010)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6108 Filed: 5/21/2010, Entered: 5/21/2010 Notice of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (A)
                                                                                                          Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 5/25/2010 at 03:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (Irgens, Andrew) (Entered: 05/21/2010)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6107 Filed: 5/20/2010, Entered: 5/20/2010 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                            Affidavit of Service of Barbara J. Witters of Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A. re: Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on May 11, 2010 at 3:30p.m. (related document(s) 6103 ) Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. (Irgens, Andrew) Modified docket text on 5/20/2010 (LMD). (Entered: 05/20/2010)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6106 Filed: 5/20/2010, Entered: 5/20/2010 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                              Affidavit of Service of Barbara J. Witters of Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A. re: Residual Trustee's Reply to Lennox National Account Services, LLC F/K/A Industrial Building Services, LLC's Response to Residual Trustee's Tenth Omnibus Substantive Objection to Claim Filed by Industrial Building Services, LLC. (related document(s) 6101 ) Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. (Irgens, Andrew) Modified docket text on 5/20/2010 (LMD). (Entered: 05/20/2010)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6105 Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: 5/11/2010 Withdrawal of Claim
                                                                                                                Withdrawal of Claim . The parcel has been paid in full. Filed by Lewis County Treasurer. (NAL) (Entered: 05/11/2010)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6104 Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: 5/11/2010 Hearing Cancelled/Rescheduled. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing.
                                                                                                                  HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 5/25/2010 at 03:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (Irgens, Andrew) (Entered: 05/11/2010)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6103 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: 5/7/2010 Notice of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (B)
                                                                                                                    Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 5/11/2010 at 03:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (Irgens, Andrew) (Entered: 05/07/2010)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6102 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: 5/7/2010 Status Report
                                                                                                                      Notice of Filing of Status Report Regarding Adversary Proceedings. Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. (Irgens, Andrew) Modified docket text on 5/7/2010 (LMD). (Entered: 05/07/2010)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6101 Filed: 5/6/2010, Entered: 5/6/2010 Reply (A)
                                                                                                                        Residual Trustee's Reply to Lennox National Account Services, LLC F/K/A Industrial Building Services, LLC's Response to Residual Trustee's Tenth Omnibus Substantive Objection to Claim Filed by Industrial Building Services, LLC. (related document(s) 2554 , 6024 ) Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee (Irgens, Andrew) Modified docket text on 5/6/2010 (LMD). (Entered: 05/06/2010)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6100 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: 4/28/2010 Letter
                                                                                                                          Letter Stating Proof of Claim has been paid in full. Filed by Fulton County Tax Commissioner . (LMD) (Entered: 04/28/2010)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6099 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: 4/14/2010 Post-Confirmation Report
                                                                                                                            Quarterly Report of the Residual Trustee for the 4th Quarter of 2009 (Period October 1, 2009 through December 31, 2009) Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. (Irgens, Andrew) Modified docket text on 4/15/2010 (LMD). (Entered: 04/14/2010)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6098 Filed: 4/5/2010, Entered: 4/9/2010 Claims Register
                                                                                                                              Claims Register in alphabetical and numerical order can be viewed upon request at the clerk's office. Filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC. (JRK) (Entered: 04/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6097 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: 3/24/2010 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                Affidavit of Service of Barbara J. Witters of Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A. re: Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on March 22, 2010 at 2:00 p.m. (related document(s) 6096 ) Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. (Maddox, Robert) Modified docket text on 3/24/2010 (LMD). (Entered: 03/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6096 Filed: 3/18/2010, Entered: 3/18/2010 Hearing Cancelled/Rescheduled. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing.
                                                                                                                                  HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 3/22/2010 at 02:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (Maddox, Robert) (Entered: 03/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6095 Filed: 3/2/2010, Entered: 3/2/2010 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                    Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Barbara J. Witters of Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A. re: Brief (Supplemental) of the Residual Trustee as to Whether Claims Transfers to ASM Capital, L.P. and ASM Capital II Were Assignments or Sales, and in Further Support of the Residual Trustee's Objection to Such Claims (related document(s) 6085 ) Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. (Irgens, Andrew) (Entered: 03/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6094 Filed: 3/2/2010, Entered: 3/2/2010 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                      Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Barbara J. Witters of Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A. re: Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on December 10, 2009 at 3:30 p.m. (related document(s) 6067 ) Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. (Irgens, Andrew) (Entered: 03/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6093 Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: 2/26/2010 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                        Affidavit of Service of Barbara J. Witters of Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A. re: Order Scheduling Omnibus Hearing Dates Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. (Irgens, Andrew) (Entered: 02/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6092 Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: 2/26/2010 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                          Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Barbara J. Witters of Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A. re: HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on February 2, 2010 at 4:00 p.m. (related document(s) 6082 ) Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. (Irgens, Andrew) (Entered: 02/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6091 Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: 2/26/2010 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                            Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Barbara J. Witters of Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A. re: Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on February 2, 2010 at 4:00 p.m. (related document(s) 6081 ) Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. (Irgens, Andrew) (Entered: 02/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6090 Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: 2/26/2010 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                              Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Barbara J. Witters of Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A. re: Order Approving Twentieth Omnibus Motion for Approval of Settlement (related document(s) 6079 ) Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. (Irgens, Andrew) (Entered: 02/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6089 Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: 2/26/2010 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Barbara J. Witters of Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A. re: Order (Second) on the Residual Trustee's Tenth Omnibus Substantive Objection to Claims (related document(s) 6077 ) Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. (Irgens, Andrew) (Entered: 02/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6088 Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: 2/26/2010 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                  Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Barbara J. Witters of Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A. re: Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 Twentieth Omnibus Motion for Order Approving Settlements Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 9019 (related document(s) 6074 ) Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. (Irgens, Andrew) (Entered: 02/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6087 Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: 2/26/2010 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                    Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Barbara J. Witters of Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A. re: Post-Confirmation Report Quarterly Report of the Residual Trustee and Reorganized Debtors for the 3rd Quarter of 2009 (July 1, 2009 through September 30, 2009) (related document(s) 6072 ) Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. (Irgens, Andrew) (Entered: 02/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6086 Filed: 2/5/2010, Entered: 2/5/2010 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                      Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Memorandum of Law Regarding Residual Trustee's Tenth Omnibus Substantive Objection to Claims (related document(s) 6084 ) Filed by ASM Capital II, L.P., ASM Capital, L.P.. (McGuire, Matthew) (Entered: 02/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6085 Filed: 2/5/2010, Entered: 2/5/2010 Brief
                                                                                                                                                        Brief (Supplemental) of the Residual Trustee as to Whether Claims Transfers to ASM Capital, L.P. and ASM Capital II Were Assignments or Sales, and in Further Support of the Residual Trustee's Objection to Such Claims (related document(s) 6012 , 6023 ) Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B) (Irgens, Andrew) Modified on 2/8/2010 (NAL). (Entered: 02/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6084 Filed: 2/5/2010, Entered: 2/5/2010 Memorandum of Law
                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum of Law Regarding Residual Trustee's Tenth Omnibus Substantive Objection to Claims (related document(s) 6012 , 6023 , 6057 ) Filed by ASM Capital II, L.P., ASM Capital, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B) (McGuire, Matthew) (Entered: 02/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6083 Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: 2/2/2010 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                            Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Barbara Witters (Order Approving Motion for Order Approving Settlement Resolving Adversary Proceeding Against THQ, Inc. Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 9019 (related document(s) 6056 ) Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. (Irgens, Andrew) (Entered: 02/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6082 Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: 2/1/2010 Hearing Cancelled/Rescheduled. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                              HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 2/2/2010 at 04:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (Irgens, Andrew) (Entered: 02/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6081 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: 1/29/2010 Notice of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (B)
                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 2/2/2010 at 04:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (Irgens, Andrew) (Entered: 01/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6080 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: 1/29/2010 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                  Status Report Regarding Adversary Proceedings Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. (Irgens, Andrew) Modified on 2/2/2010 (NAL). (Entered: 01/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6079 Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: 1/25/2010 Order
                                                                                                                                                                    Order Approving Twentieth Omnibus Motion for Approval of Settlement (related document(s) 6074 ) Order Signed on 1/25/2010. (LMD) (Entered: 01/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6078 Filed: 1/22/2010, Entered: 1/22/2010 Certificate of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of No Objection Twentieth Omnibus Motion for Order Approving Settlements Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 9019 (related document(s) 6074 ) Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. (Irgens, Andrew) (Entered: 01/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6077 Filed: 1/6/2010, Entered: 1/6/2010 Order
                                                                                                                                                                        Order (Second) on the Residual Trustee's Tenth Omnibus Substantive Objection to Claims (related document(s) 6012 , 6076 ) Order Signed on 1/6/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A"# 2 Exhibit "B") (LMD) (Entered: 01/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6076 Filed: 1/5/2010, Entered: 1/5/2010 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                          Certification of Counsel Regarding Order on Supplemental Briefing Schedule with Respect to the Residual Trustee's Tenth Omnibus Substantive Objection to Claims Pursuant to Section 502(b) of the Bankruptcy Code, Bankrupty Rules 3003 and 3007, and Local Rule 3007-1 (related document(s) 6012 ) Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. (Irgens, Andrew) (Entered: 01/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6075 Filed: 1/5/2010, Entered: 1/5/2010 Order Setting Omnibus Hearing Dates
                                                                                                                                                                            Order Setting Omnibus Hearing Dates. All hearings will be held at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware (Related document(s) 6073 ). Omnibus Hearings scheduled for 2/2/2010 at 04:00 PM. Signed on 1/5/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A") (LMD) (Entered: 01/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6074 Filed: 1/4/2010, Entered: 1/4/2010 Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019
                                                                                                                                                                              Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 Twentieth Omnibus Motion for Order Approving Settlements Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 9019 Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 2/4/2010 at 04:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 1/19/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B) (Irgens, Andrew) (Entered: 01/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6073 Filed: 1/4/2010, Entered: 1/4/2010 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                Certification of Counsel Regarding Scheduling Omnibus Hearing Dates Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. (Irgens, Andrew) (Entered: 01/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6072 Filed: 1/4/2010, Entered: 1/4/2010 Post-Confirmation Report
                                                                                                                                                                                  Post-Confirmation Report Quarterly Report of the Residual Trustee and Reorganized Debtors for the 3rd Quarter of 2009 (July 1, 2009 through September 30, 2009) Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. (Irgens, Andrew) (Entered: 01/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6071 Filed: 12/24/2009, Entered: 12/25/2009 BNC Certificate of Mailing.
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6070 Filed: 12/22/2009, Entered: 12/22/2009 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6069 Filed: 12/21/2009, Entered: 12/21/2009 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6068 Filed: 12/10/2009, Entered: 12/14/2009 Hearing Held/Court Sign-In Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6067 Filed: 12/8/2009, Entered: 12/8/2009 Notice of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (A)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6066 Filed: 12/8/2009, Entered: 12/8/2009 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6065 Filed: 11/25/2009, Entered: 11/25/2009 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6064 Filed: 11/24/2009, Entered: 11/24/2009 Response (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6063 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: 11/23/2009 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6062 Filed: 11/19/2009, Entered: 11/20/2009 Hearing Held/Court Sign-In Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6061 Filed: 11/19/2009, Entered: 11/19/2009 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6060 Filed: 11/19/2009, Entered: 11/19/2009 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6059 Filed: 11/19/2009, Entered: 11/19/2009 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6058 Filed: 11/17/2009, Entered: 11/17/2009 Notice of Withdrawal (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6057 Filed: 11/16/2009, Entered: 11/16/2009 Reply (A)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6056 Filed: 11/16/2009, Entered: 11/16/2009 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6055 Filed: 11/13/2009, Entered: 11/13/2009 Certificate of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6054 Filed: 11/6/2009, Entered: 11/6/2009 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6053 Filed: 11/6/2009, Entered: 11/6/2009 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6052 Filed: 11/5/2009, Entered: 11/5/2009 Notice of Adjourned/Rescheduled Hearing(B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6051 Filed: 11/5/2009, Entered: 11/5/2009 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6050 Filed: 10/28/2009, Entered: 10/28/2009 Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6049 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: 10/26/2009 Order Setting Omnibus Hearing Dates
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6048 Filed: 10/20/2009, Entered: 10/20/2009 Post-Confirmation Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6047 Filed: 10/20/2009, Entered: 10/20/2009 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6046 Filed: 10/20/2009, Entered: 10/20/2009 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6045 Filed: 10/19/2009, Entered: 10/19/2009 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6044 Filed: 10/19/2009, Entered: 10/19/2009 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6043 Filed: 10/12/2009, Entered: 10/12/2009 Hearing Cancelled/Rescheduled. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6042 Filed: 10/12/2009, Entered: 10/12/2009 Notice of Adjournment(B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6041 Filed: 10/12/2009, Entered: 10/12/2009 Certificate of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6040 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: 10/8/2009 Notice of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6039 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: 10/8/2009 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6038 Filed: 10/7/2009, Entered: 10/7/2009 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Barbara J. Witters of Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A. [Re: Order (Amended) Granting the Residual Trustee's Tenth Omnibus Substantive Objection to Claims] (related document(s) 6032 ) Filed by KB Toys, Inc.. (Irgens, Andrew) (Entered: 10/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6037 Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: 10/5/2009 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Barbara J. Witters of Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A. [Re: Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 9/4/2009 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware] (related document(s) 6026 ) Filed by KB Toys, Inc.. (Irgens, Andrew) (Entered: 10/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6036 Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: 10/5/2009 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Barbara J. Witters of Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A. [Re: Order Extending the Deadline to Object to Claims] (related document(s) 6025 ) Filed by KB Toys, Inc.. (Irgens, Andrew) (Entered: 10/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6035 Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: 10/5/2009 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Affidavit of Service of Barbara J. Witters of Richards, Layton & Finger [Re: Amended Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation and Appointing Mediator (Docket No. 57) and Amended Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation and Appointing Mediator (Docket No. 58)] Filed by KB Toys, Inc.. (Irgens, Andrew) (Entered: 10/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6034 Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: 10/5/2009 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Affidavit of Service of Barbara J. Witters of Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A. [Re: Order Granting Stipulation Between Plaintiff and Defendant Extending Plaintiff's Response Time and Other Related Dates] Filed by KB Toys, Inc.. (Irgens, Andrew) (Entered: 10/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6033 Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: 10/5/2009 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Affidavit of Service of Barbara J. Witters of Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A. [Re: Order Approving Stipulation (Second) Between Plaintiff and Defendant Further Extending Fact Discovery and Other Related Dates] Filed by KB Toys, Inc.. (Irgens, Andrew) (Entered: 10/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6032 Filed: 10/2/2009, Entered: 10/2/2009 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order (Amended) Granting the Residual Trustee's Tenth Omnibus Substantive Objection to Claims (related document(s) 6012 , 6030 ) Order Signed on 10/2/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A thru C) (NAL) (Entered: 10/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6031 Filed: 9/30/2009, Entered: 9/30/2009 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certification of Counsel Regarding Amended Order Granting the Residual Trustee's Tenth Omnibus Substantive Objection to Claims Pursuant to Section 502(b) of the Bankruptcy Code, Bankruptcy Rules 3003 and 3007, and Local Rule 3007-1 (related document(s) 6012 , 6030 ) Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. (Irgens, Andrew) (Entered: 09/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6030 Filed: 9/25/2009, Entered: 9/25/2009 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order Granting the Residual Trustee's Tenth Omnibus Substantive Objection to Claims (related document(s) 6012 ) Order Signed on 9/24/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A thru C) (NAL) (Entered: 09/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6029 Filed: 9/23/2009, Entered: 9/23/2009 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certification of Counsel Regarding Order Granting the Residual Trustee's Tenth Omnibus Substantive Objection to Claims Pursuant to Section 502(b) of the Bankruptcy Code, Bankruptcy Rules 3003 and 3007, and Local Rule 3007-1 (related document(s) 6012 ) Filed by Residual Trust of KB Toys, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2) (Irgens, Andrew) (Entered: 09/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6028 Filed: 9/22/2009, Entered: 9/22/2009 Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 Re. Eighteenth Omnibus Motion for Order Approving Settlements Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 10/13/2009 at 01:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 10/6/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibits A-E# 3 Certificate of Service) (Irgens, Andrew) Modified on 9/30/2009 (NAL). (Entered: 09/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6027 Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: 9/2/2009 Hearing Cancelled/Rescheduled. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            HEARING CANCELLED. Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 9/4/2009 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Finnegan, Maris) (Entered: 09/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6026 Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: 9/2/2009 Notice of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 9/4/2009 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (Knight, John) (Entered: 09/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6025 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: 8/31/2009 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Extending the Deadline to Object to Claims (related document(s) 6004 ) Order Signed on 8/31/2009. (LMD) (Entered: 08/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6024 Filed: 8/28/2009, Entered: 8/28/2009 Response (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Response to the Residual Trustee's Tenth Omnibus Substantive Objection to Claim Filed by Industrial Building Services, LLC (related document(s) 6012 ) Filed by Lennox National Account Services, LLC f/k/a Industrial Building Services, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Certificate of Service) (Palacio, Ricardo) (Entered: 08/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6023 Filed: 8/28/2009, Entered: 8/28/2009 Response (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Response to Residual Trustee's Tenth Omnibus Substantive Objection to Claims Pursuant to Sections 502(b) and 502(d) of the Bankruptcy Code, Bankruptcy Rules 3003 and 3007 and Local Rule 3007-1 (related document(s) 6012 ) Filed by ASM Capital II, L.P., ASM Capital, L.P. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (McGuire, Matthew) (Entered: 08/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6022 Filed: 8/24/2009, Entered: 8/24/2009 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order Further Extending Deadline to Object to Claims (related document(s) 6013 ) Order Signed on 8/21/2009. (LMD) (Entered: 08/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6021 Filed: 8/21/2009, Entered: 8/21/2009 Notice of Submission of Proof of Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Submission of Proof of Claim For Residual Trustee's Tenth Omnibus Substantive Objection to Claims Pursuant to Section 502(b) and 502(d) of the Bankruptcy Code, Bankruptcy Rules 3003 and 3007 and Local Rule 3007-1 (related document(s) 6012 ) Filed by Residual Trust of KB Toys, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Finnegan, Maris) (Entered: 08/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6020 Filed: 8/19/2009, Entered: 8/19/2009 Certificate of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of No Objection Regarding Debtors' Motion to Extend Debtors' Deadline to Object to Claims (related document(s) 6013 ) Filed by KB Toys, Inc.. (Lunn, Matthew) Modified on 8/20/2009 to eliminate duplicate text (NAL). (Entered: 08/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6019 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: 8/18/2009 Claims Register
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Claims Register in alphabetical and numerical order can be viewed upon request at the Clerk's Office. Filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC. (JRK) (Entered: 08/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6018 Filed: 8/12/2009, Entered: 8/12/2009 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Barbara J. Witters (Re: Residual Trustee's Tenth Omnibus Substantive Objection to Claims Pursuant to Sections 365(d), 502(b) and 502(d) of the Bankruptcy Code, Bankruptcy Rules 3003 and 3007, and Local Rule 3007-1) (related document(s) 6012 ) Filed by KB Toys, Inc.. (Finnegan, Maris) (Entered: 08/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6017 Filed: 8/12/2009, Entered: 8/12/2009 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Affidavit of Service of Barbara J. Witters (Re: Notice of Amended Agenda of Matters for Hearing on July 21, 2009 at 1:30 p.m.) Filed by KB Toys, Inc.. (Finnegan, Maris) (Entered: 08/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6016 Filed: 8/12/2009, Entered: 8/12/2009 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Affidavit of Service of Barbara J. Witters (Re: Order Approving Seventeenth Omnibus Motion for Approval of Settlements) Filed by KB Toys, Inc.. (Finnegan, Maris) (Entered: 08/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6015 Filed: 8/12/2009, Entered: 8/12/2009 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Affidavit of Service of Barbara J. Witters (Re: Notice of Agenda of Matters for Hearing on July 21, 2009 at 1:30 p.m.) Filed by KB Toys, Inc.. (Finnegan, Maris) (Entered: 08/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6014 Filed: 8/6/2009, Entered: 8/6/2009 Certificate of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of No Objection re. Motion for an Order Further Extending the Deadline to Object to Claims (related document(s) 6004 ) Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. (Finnegan, Maris) Modified on 8/7/2009 (NAL). (Entered: 08/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6013 Filed: 8/3/2009, Entered: 8/3/2009 Motion to Extend (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion to Extend Debtors' Deadline to Object to Claims Filed by KB Toys, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 8/26/2009 at 03:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 8/14/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Proposed Form of Order # 3 Certificate of Service) (Lunn, Matthew) (Entered: 08/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6012 Filed: 7/31/2009, Entered: 7/31/2009 Objection to Claims (Omnibus)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Omnibus Objection to Claims (Tenth) Substantive Pursuant to Sections 502(b) and 502(d) of the Bankruptcy Code, Bankruptcy Rules 3003 and 3007, and Local Rule 3007-1 Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 9/4/2009 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 8/28/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C) (Finnegan, Maris) Modified on 8/3/2009 to eliminate duplicate text (NAL). (Entered: 07/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6011 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: 7/29/2009 Order on Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Approving Seventeenth Omnibus Motion For Approval Of Settlements. (Related Doc # 5999 ) Order Signed on 7/17/2009. (BMT) (Entered: 07/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6010 Filed: 7/28/2009, Entered: 7/28/2009 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Barbara J. Witters (Re: Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on May 19, 2009 at 3:30 p.m.) (related document(s) 5993 ) Filed by KB Toys, Inc.. (Knight, John) (Entered: 07/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6009 Filed: 7/28/2009, Entered: 7/28/2009 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Barbara J. Witters (Re: Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on April 7, 2009 at 11:30 a.m.) (related document(s) 5980 ) Filed by KB Toys, Inc.. (Irgens, Andrew) (Entered: 07/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6008 Filed: 7/28/2009, Entered: 7/28/2009 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Barbara J. Witters (Re: Quarterly Report of the Residual Trustee and Reorganized Debtors for the 1st Quarter of 2009) (related document(s) 6006 ) Filed by KB Toys, Inc.. (Finnegan, Maris) (Entered: 07/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6007 Filed: 7/20/2009, Entered: 7/20/2009 Notice of Withdrawal (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel. Filed by V. Suarez & Co., Inc.. (Hall, Jerry) Modified on 7/22/2009 to correct docket text. (KPB). (Entered: 07/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6006 Filed: 7/20/2009, Entered: 7/20/2009 Post-Confirmation Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Post-Confirmation Report of the Residual Trustee and Reorganized Debtors for the 1st Quarter of 2009 Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. (Finnegan, Maris) Modified on 8/5/2009 to eliminate duplicate text (NAL). (Entered: 07/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6005 Filed: 7/17/2009, Entered: 7/17/2009 Hearing Cancelled/Rescheduled. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        HEARING CANCELLED. Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 7/21/2009 at 01:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (Finnegan, Maris) (Entered: 07/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6004 Filed: 7/17/2009, Entered: 7/17/2009 Motion to Extend (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion to Extend Deadline to Object to Claims Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 8/26/2009 at 03:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 8/4/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A# 3 Certificate of Service) (Finnegan, Maris) Modified on 8/5/2009 to eliminate duplicate text (NAL). (Entered: 07/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6003 Filed: 7/17/2009, Entered: 7/17/2009 Notice of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 7/21/2009 at 01:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (Kandestin, Cory) (Entered: 07/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6002 Filed: 7/17/2009, Entered: 7/17/2009 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Status Report Regarding Adversary Proceedings Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. (Kandestin, Cory) Modified on 8/5/2009 to eliminate duplicate text (NAL). (Entered: 07/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6001 Filed: 7/17/2009, Entered: 7/17/2009 Notice of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by KB Toys, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 7/21/2009 at 01:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (Waite, Joel) (Entered: 07/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6000 Filed: 7/16/2009, Entered: 7/16/2009 Certificate of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of No Objection re. Seventeenth Omnibus Motion for Order Approving Settlements Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 9019 (related document(s) 5999 ) Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. (Finnegan, Maris) Modified on 7/22/2009 (NAL). (Entered: 07/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5999 Filed: 6/24/2009, Entered: 6/24/2009 Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 re. Seventeenth Omnibus Motion for Order Approving Settlements Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 9019 Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 7/21/2009 at 01:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 7/13/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit # 3 Certificate of Service) (Riffin, Timothy) Modified on 6/29/2009 (NAL). (Entered: 06/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5998 Filed: 6/4/2009, Entered: 6/5/2009 BNC Certificate of Mailing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      BNC Certificate of Mailing. (related document(s) 5997 ) Service Date 06/04/2009. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5997 Filed: 6/2/2009, Entered: 6/2/2009 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Transcript regarding Hearing Held 5/19/2009 Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 8/31/2009. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. [For information about how to contact the transcriber, call the Clerk's Office] or [Contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber Writers Cramp, Telephone number (732)329-0191.] (RE: related document(s) 5995 ). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 6/9/2009. Redaction Request Due By 6/23/2009. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 7/3/2009. Transcript access will be restricted through 8/31/2009. (BJM) (Entered: 06/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5996 Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: 5/26/2009 Hearing Held/Court Sign-In Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Hearing Held/Court Sign-In Sheet (related document(s) 5993 , 5995 ) (LMD) (Entered: 05/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5995 Filed: 5/15/2009, Entered: 5/15/2009 Notice of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 5/19/2009 at 03:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Kandestin, Cory) (Entered: 05/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5994 Filed: 5/15/2009, Entered: 5/15/2009 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Status Report Notice of Filing of Status Report Regarding Adversary Proceedings Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. (Kandestin, Cory) (Entered: 05/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5993 Filed: 5/15/2009, Entered: 5/15/2009 Notice of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by KB Toys, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 5/19/2009 at 03:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (Lunn, Matthew) (Entered: 05/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5992 Filed: 5/14/2009, Entered: 5/14/2009 Order on Motion to Extend Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Further Extending Deadline To Object To Claims. (Related Doc # 5984 ) Order Signed on 5/14/2009. (BMT) (Entered: 05/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5991 Filed: 5/13/2009, Entered: 5/13/2009 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Barbara J. Witters (Order Further Extending Deadline to Object to Claims) (related document(s) 5988 ) Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. (Knight, John) (Entered: 05/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5990 Filed: 5/13/2009, Entered: 5/13/2009 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Affidavit/Declaration of Service [Re: Reorganized Debtors' Motion for an Order Further Extending the Deadline to Object to Claims] (related document(s) 5984 ) Filed by KB Toys, Inc.. (Lunn, Matthew) (Entered: 05/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5989 Filed: 5/13/2009, Entered: 5/13/2009 Certificate of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of No Objection Regarding Docket No. 5984 [Reorganized Debtors' Motion for an Order Further Extending the Deadline to Object to Claims] (related document(s) 5984 ) Filed by KB Toys, Inc.. (Lunn, Matthew) (Entered: 05/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5988 Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: 5/12/2009 Order on Motion to Extend Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Further Extending the Deadline to Object to Claims. (Related Doc # 5979 ) Order Signed on 5/11/2009. (LCN) (Entered: 05/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5987 Filed: 4/24/2009, Entered: 4/24/2009 Certificate of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of No Objection Motion for an Order Further Extending the Deadline to Object to Claims (related document(s) 5979 ) Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. (Kandestin, Cory) (Entered: 04/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5986 Filed: 4/24/2009, Entered: 4/24/2009 Order Setting Omnibus Hearing Dates
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Setting Omnibus Hearing Dates. All hearings will be held at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware (Related document(s) 5985 ). Omnibus Hearings scheduled for 5/19/2009 at 03:30 PM. Signed on 4/24/2009. (Stratford, Carmen) (Entered: 04/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5985 Filed: 4/20/2009, Entered: 4/20/2009 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certification of Counsel Regarding Scheduling of Omnibus Hearing Date Filed by KB Toys, Inc.. (Waite, Joel) (Entered: 04/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5984 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: 4/17/2009 Motion to Extend (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion to Extend / Reorganized Debtors' Motion for an Order Further Extending the Deadline to Object to Claims Filed by KB Toys, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 5/19/2009 at 03:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/12/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Proposed Form of Order) (Lunn, Matthew) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5983 Filed: 4/15/2009, Entered: 4/15/2009 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Barbara J. Witters (Notice of Substitution of Counsel) (related document(s) 5977 ) Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. (Knight, John) (Entered: 04/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5982 Filed: 4/15/2009, Entered: 4/15/2009 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Barbara J. Witters (Notice of Agenda of Matters for Hearing on March 3, 2009 at 11:00 a.m.) (related document(s) 5972 ) Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. (Knight, John) (Entered: 04/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5981 Filed: 4/15/2009, Entered: 4/15/2009 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Barbara J. Witters (Quarterly Report of the Residual Trustee and Reorganized Debtors for the 3rd Quarter of 2008 and Quarterly Report of the Residual Trustee and Reorganized Debtors for the 4th Quarter of 2008) (related document(s) 5974 , 5975 ) Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. (Knight, John) (Entered: 04/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5980 Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: 4/3/2009 Hearing Cancelled/Rescheduled. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 4/7/2009 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (Irgens, Andrew) (Entered: 04/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5979 Filed: 4/2/2009, Entered: 4/2/2009 Motion to Extend (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion to Extend Motion for an Order Further Extending the Deadline to Object to Claims Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 5/19/2009 at 03:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 4/20/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Notice # 2 Exhibit A# 3 Certificate of Service) (Irgens, Andrew) (Entered: 04/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5978 Filed: 3/24/2009, Entered: 3/26/2009 Claims Register
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Claims Register in alphabetical and numerical order. Filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC. (JRK) (Entered: 03/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5977 Filed: 3/4/2009, Entered: 3/4/2009 Notice of Substitution of Counsel (A)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Substitution of Counsel Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. (Knight, John) Modified Text on 3/6/2009 (LC). (Entered: 03/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5976 Filed: 3/4/2009, Entered: 3/4/2009 Hearing Held/Court Sign-In Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Hearing Held/Court Sign-In Sheet (related document(s) 5972 ) (LMD) (Entered: 03/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5975 Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: 3/3/2009 Post-Confirmation Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Post-Confirmation Report (Quarterly) for the 4th Quarter of 2008 Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. (Knight, John) Modified on 3/5/2009 to Correct Text (LC). (Entered: 03/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5974 Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: 3/3/2009 Post-Confirmation Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Post-Confirmation Report (Quarterly) for the 3rd Quarter of 2008 Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. (Knight, John) Modified on 3/5/2009 to Correct Text (LC). (Entered: 03/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5973 Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: 3/3/2009 Minute Entry
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minutes of Hearing held on: 03/03/2009 Subject: Adversaries. (vCal Hearing ID (85249)). (NJH) (Entered: 03/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5972 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: 2/27/2009 Notice of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (Adversary) Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 3/3/2009 at 11:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (Knight, John) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5971 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: 2/27/2009 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Status Report Regarding Adversary Proceedings Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. (Knight, John) Modified on 3/4/2009 to Correct Text (LC). (Entered: 02/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5970 Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: 2/20/2009 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Barbara J. Witters (Order Approving the Settlement of Preference Claims Against Mattel, Inc. and Related Entities Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 9019) (related document(s) 5963 ) Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. (Knight, John) (Entered: 02/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5969 Filed: 2/4/2009, Entered: 2/4/2009 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Affidavit/Declaration of Service Regarding [Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for January 29, 2009 at 2:30 p.m. (ET)] (related document(s) 5968 ) Filed by KB Toys, Inc. (Lunn, Matthew) Modified on 2/6/2009 to Correct Text (LC). (Entered: 02/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5968 Filed: 1/28/2009, Entered: 1/28/2009 Hearing Cancelled/Rescheduled. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  HEARING CANCELLED. Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. (related document(s) 5962 ) Filed by KB Toys, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 1/29/2009 at 02:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (Lunn, Matthew) (Entered: 01/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5967 Filed: 1/28/2009, Entered: 1/28/2009 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Barbara J. Witters (Order Approving the Settlement of Preference Claims Against Lego Systems, Inc. Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 9019) (related document(s) 5945 ) Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. (Knight, John) (Entered: 01/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5966 Filed: 1/28/2009, Entered: 1/28/2009 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Barbara J. Witters (Order Further Extending Deadline to Object to Claims) (related document(s) 5947 ) Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. (Knight, John) (Entered: 01/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5965 Filed: 1/28/2009, Entered: 1/28/2009 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Barbara J. Witters (Order Approving Seventeenth Omnibus Motion for Approval of Settlements) (related document(s) 5946 ) Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. (Knight, John) (Entered: 01/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5964 Filed: 1/28/2009, Entered: 1/28/2009 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Barbara J. Witters (Notice of Agenda of Matters for Hearing on December 10, 2008 at 2:30 p.m.) (related document(s) 5944 ) Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. (Knight, John) (Entered: 01/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5963 Filed: 1/27/2009, Entered: 1/27/2009 Order on Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Approving the Settlement of Preference Claims Against Mattel, Inc. and Related Entities. (Related Doc # 5954 ) Order Signed on 1/27/2009. (LMD) (Entered: 01/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5962 Filed: 1/27/2009, Entered: 1/27/2009 Notice of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by KB Toys, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 1/29/2009 at 02:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (Lunn, Matthew) (Entered: 01/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5961 Filed: 1/27/2009, Entered: 1/27/2009 Hearing Cancelled/Rescheduled. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 1/29/2009 at 02:30 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (Knight, John) (Entered: 01/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5960 Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: 1/26/2009 Certificate of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of No Objection Motion for an Order Approving the Settlement of Preference Claims Against Mattel, Inc. Related Entities Pursuant to Bankrputcy Rule 9019 (related document(s) 5954 ) Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. (Kandestin, Cory) (Entered: 01/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5959 Filed: 1/21/2009, Entered: 1/21/2009 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Barbara J. Witters (Fifteenth Order Granting the Residual Trustee's Fifth Omnibus Substantive Obejction to Claims Pursuant to Section 502(b) of the Bankruptcy Code, Bankruptcy Rules 3003 and 3007 and Local Rule 3007-1 and Granting Related Relief) (related document(s) 5930 ) Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. (Knight, John) (Entered: 01/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5958 Filed: 1/21/2009, Entered: 1/21/2009 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Barbara J. Witters (Third Order Granting the Residual Trustee's Second Omnibus Non-Substantive Objection to Claims Pursuant to Section 502(b) of the Bankruptcy Code, Bankruptcy Rules 3003 and 3007 and Local Rule 3007-1 and Granting Related Relief) (related document(s) 5928 ) Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. (Knight, John) (Entered: 01/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5957 Filed: 1/21/2009, Entered: 1/21/2009 Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Paul Belobritsky of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (Order Granting the Reorganized Debtors and Residual Trustee's Nineteenth Omnibus Substantive Objection to Claims Pursuant to Section 502(B) of the Bankruptcy Code, Bankruptcy Rules 3003 and 3007 and Local Rule 3007-1 and Granting Related Relief). Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. (related document(s) 5908 ) (Knight, John) (Entered: 01/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5956 Filed: 1/21/2009, Entered: 1/21/2009 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Barbara J. Witters (Order Approving Sixteenth Omnibus Motion for Approval of Settlements) (related document(s) 5909 ) Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. (Knight, John) (Entered: 01/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5955 Filed: 1/21/2009, Entered: 1/21/2009 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Affidavit/Declaration of Service of Barbara J. Witters (Order Granting the Reorganized Debtors and Residual Trustee's Ninteenth Omnibus Substantive Objection to Claims Pursuant to Section 502(b) of the Bankruptcy Code, Bankruptcy Rules 3003 and 3007 and Local Rule 3007-1 and Granting Related Relief) (related document(s) 5908 ) Filed by Abacus Advisors Group LLC, the Residual Trustee. (Knight, John) (Entered: 01/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5954 Filed: 12/30/2008, Entered: 12/30/2008 Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5953 Filed: 12/16/2008, Entered: 12/16/2008 Transfer/Assignment of Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5952 Filed: 12/10/2008, Entered: 12/11/2008 Minute Entry
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5951 Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: 12/11/2008 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5950 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: 12/8/2008 Hearing Cancelled/Rescheduled. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5949 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: 12/8/2008 Order on Motion to Extend Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5948 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: 12/8/2008 Order on Motion to Extend Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5947 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: 12/8/2008 Order on Motion to Extend Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5946 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: 12/8/2008 Order on Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5945 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: 12/8/2008 Order on Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5944 Filed: 12/5/2008, Entered: 12/5/2008 Notice of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (A)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5943 Filed: 12/5/2008, Entered: 12/5/2008 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5942 Filed: 12/5/2008, Entered: 12/5/2008 Notice of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5941 Filed: 12/5/2008, Entered: 12/5/2008 Certificate of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5940 Filed: 12/5/2008, Entered: 12/5/2008 Certificate of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5939 Filed: 12/5/2008, Entered: 12/5/2008 Certificate of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5938 Filed: 12/5/2008, Entered: 12/5/2008 Certificate of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5937 Filed: 12/5/2008, Entered: 12/5/2008 Certificate of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5936 Filed: 12/5/2008, Entered: 12/5/2008 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5935 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: 11/21/2008 Motion to Extend (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5934 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: 11/21/2008 Motion to Extend (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5933 Filed: 11/19/2008, Entered: 11/19/2008 Motion to Extend (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5932 Filed: 11/19/2008, Entered: 11/19/2008 Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5931 Filed: 11/19/2008, Entered: 11/19/2008 Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5930 Filed: 11/19/2008, Entered: 11/19/2008 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5929 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: 11/18/2008 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5928 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: 11/18/2008 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5927 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: 11/17/2008 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5926 Filed: 11/14/2008, Entered: 11/14/2008 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5925 Filed: 11/13/2008, Entered: 11/13/2008 Notice of Hearing (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5924 Filed: 11/3/2008, Entered: 11/3/2008 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5923 Filed: 10/31/2008, Entered: 10/31/2008 Notice of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5922 Filed: 10/30/2008, Entered: 10/31/2008 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5921 Filed: 10/28/2008, Entered: 10/28/2008 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5920 Filed: 10/28/2008, Entered: 10/28/2008 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5919 Filed: 10/28/2008, Entered: 10/28/2008 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5918 Filed: 10/28/2008, Entered: 10/28/2008 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5917 Filed: 10/28/2008, Entered: 10/28/2008 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5916 Filed: 10/28/2008, Entered: 10/28/2008 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5915 Filed: 10/28/2008, Entered: 10/28/2008 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5914 Filed: 10/28/2008, Entered: 10/28/2008 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5913 Filed: 10/28/2008, Entered: 10/28/2008 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5912 Filed: 10/28/2008, Entered: 10/28/2008 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5911 Filed: 10/28/2008, Entered: 10/28/2008 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5910 Filed: 10/28/2008, Entered: 10/28/2008 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5909 Filed: 10/23/2008, Entered: 10/23/2008 Order on Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5908 Filed: 10/23/2008, Entered: 10/23/2008 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5907 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: 10/21/2008 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5906 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: 10/16/2008 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5905 Filed: 10/15/2008, Entered: 10/15/2008 Certificate of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5904 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: 10/7/2008 Hearing Cancelled/Rescheduled. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5903 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: 10/7/2008 Notice of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5902 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: 10/7/2008 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5901 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: 10/7/2008 Notice of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5900 Filed: 9/23/2008, Entered: 9/23/2008 Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5899 Filed: 9/18/2008, Entered: 9/18/2008 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5898 Filed: 9/18/2008, Entered: 9/18/2008 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5897 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: 8/26/2008 Corrective Entry
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5896 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5895 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5894 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5893 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5892 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5891 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008 Hearing Held/Court Sign-In Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5890 Filed: 8/15/2008, Entered: 8/15/2008 Order Setting Omnibus Hearing Dates
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5889 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: 8/14/2008 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5888 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: 8/14/2008 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5887 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: 8/14/2008 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5886 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: 8/14/2008 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5885 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: 8/14/2008 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5884 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: 8/13/2008 Order on Motion to Extend Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5883 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: 8/13/2008 Order on Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5882 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: 8/13/2008 Order on Motion to Extend Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5881 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: 8/13/2008 Order on Motion to Extend Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5880 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: 8/13/2008 Order Setting Omnibus Hearing Dates
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5879 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: 8/12/2008 Hearing Cancelled/Rescheduled. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5878 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: 8/12/2008 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5877 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: 8/12/2008 Notice of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5876 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: 8/12/2008 Certificate of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5875 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: 8/12/2008 Certificate of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5874 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008 Post-Confirmation Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5873 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5872 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008 Certificate of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5871 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008 Certificate of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5870 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008 Notice of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5869 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5868 Filed: 8/9/2008, Entered: 8/9/2008 Stipulation Regarding Appointment of Mediator
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5867 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008 Withdrawal of Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5866 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: 7/24/2008 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5865 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: 7/24/2008 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5864 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: 7/24/2008 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5863 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: 7/24/2008 Motion to Extend (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5862 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: 7/24/2008 Motion to Extend (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5861 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: 7/22/2008 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5860 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: 7/22/2008 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5859 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: 7/8/2008 Order Setting Omnibus Hearing Dates
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5858 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: 7/8/2008 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5857 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: 7/8/2008 Hearing Cancelled/Rescheduled. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5856 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: 7/8/2008 Order on Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5855 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5854 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5853 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008 Notice of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5852 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008 Motion to Extend (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5851 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008 Certificate of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5850 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008 Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5849 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: 6/27/2008 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5848 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: 6/27/2008 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5847 Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: 6/23/2008 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5846 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5845 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: 6/19/2008 Hearing Held/Court Sign-In Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5844 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: 6/17/2008 Order on Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5843 Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: 6/16/2008 Notice of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5842 Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: 6/16/2008 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5841 Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: 6/16/2008 Notice of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5840 Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: 6/13/2008 Certificate of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5839 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: 6/6/2008 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5838 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: 6/6/2008 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5837 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008 Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5836 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008 Notice of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5835 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: 5/29/2008 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5834 Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: 5/28/2008 Post-Confirmation Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5833 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: 5/27/2008 Certificate of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5832 Filed: 5/21/2008, Entered: 5/21/2008 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5831 Filed: 5/15/2008, Entered: 5/15/2008 Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5830 Filed: 5/15/2008, Entered: 5/15/2008 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5829 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: 5/12/2008 Order on Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5828 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: 5/12/2008 Notice of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5827 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: 5/9/2008 Certificate of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5826 Filed: 5/7/2008, Entered: 5/7/2008 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5825 Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: 5/6/2008 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5824 Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: 5/6/2008 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5823 Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: 5/6/2008 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5822 Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: 5/6/2008 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5821 Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: 5/2/2008 Notice of Adjourned/Rescheduled Hearing(B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5820 Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: 4/30/2008 Certificate of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5819 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: 4/29/2008 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5818 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: 4/29/2008 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5817 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: 4/25/2008 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5816 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: 4/25/2008 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5815 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: 4/25/2008 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5814 Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: 4/24/2008 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5813 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: 4/23/2008 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5812 Filed: 4/18/2008, Entered: 4/18/2008 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5811 Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: 4/16/2008 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5810 Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: 4/16/2008 Notice of Withdrawal (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5809 Filed: 4/12/2008, Entered: 4/12/2008 Notice of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5808 Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: 4/11/2008 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5807 Filed: 4/10/2008, Entered: 4/10/2008 Hearing Cancelled/Rescheduled. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5806 Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: 4/8/2008 Order on Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5805 Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: 4/8/2008 Order on Motion to Extend Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5804 Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: 4/8/2008 Order on Motion to Extend Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5803 Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: 4/8/2008 Order on Motion to Extend Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5802 Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: 4/8/2008 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5801 Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: 4/8/2008 Notice of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5800 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: 4/7/2008 Certificate of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5799 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: 4/7/2008 Certificate of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5798 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: 4/7/2008 Notice of Removal (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5797 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: 4/7/2008 Certificate of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5796 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: 4/4/2008 Certificate of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5795 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: 4/4/2008 Certificate of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5794 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: 4/3/2008 Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5793 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: 4/1/2008 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5792 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: 4/1/2008 Motion to Authorize (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5791 Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: 3/14/2008 Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5790 Filed: 3/13/2008, Entered: 3/13/2008 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5789 Filed: 3/13/2008, Entered: 3/13/2008 Motion to Extend (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5788 Filed: 3/13/2008, Entered: 3/13/2008 Motion to Extend (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5787 Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008 Hearing Cancelled/Rescheduled. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5786 Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008 Notice of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5785 Filed: 3/4/2008, Entered: 3/4/2008 Motion to Extend (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5784 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: 2/28/2008 Hearing Held/Court Sign-In Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5783 Filed: 2/27/2008, Entered: 2/27/2008 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5782 Filed: 2/22/2008, Entered: 2/22/2008 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5781 Filed: 2/22/2008, Entered: 2/22/2008 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5780 Filed: 2/22/2008, Entered: 2/22/2008 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5779 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: 2/20/2008 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5778 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: 2/20/2008 Notice of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5777 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: 2/20/2008 Order Setting Omnibus Hearing Dates
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5776 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5775 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008 Notice of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5774 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5773 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: 2/15/2008 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5772 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: 2/15/2008 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5771 Filed: 2/12/2008, Entered: 2/12/2008 Hearing Cancelled/Rescheduled. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5770 Filed: 2/12/2008, Entered: 2/12/2008 Order on Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5769 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: 2/8/2008 Notice of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5768 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: 2/8/2008 Post-Confirmation Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5767 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: 2/8/2008 Certificate of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5766 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: 2/5/2008 Notice of Withdrawal (C)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5765 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: 2/5/2008 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5764 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: 2/5/2008 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5763 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: 1/30/2008 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5762 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: 1/30/2008 Notice of Submission of Proof of Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5761 Filed: 1/23/2008, Entered: 1/23/2008 Withdrawal of Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5760 Filed: 1/11/2008, Entered: 1/11/2008 Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5759 Filed: 1/11/2008, Entered: 1/11/2008 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5758 Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: 1/9/2008 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5757 Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: 1/8/2008 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5756 Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: 1/8/2008 Hearing Held/Court Sign-In Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5755 Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: 1/8/2008 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5754 Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: 1/8/2008 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5753 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: 1/4/2008 Order on Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5752 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: 1/4/2008 Notice of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5751 Filed: 1/3/2008, Entered: 1/3/2008 Certificate of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5750 Filed: 1/2/2008, Entered: 1/2/2008 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5749 Filed: 12/26/2007, Entered: 12/26/2007 Notice of Submission of Proof of Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5748 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/21/2007 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5747 Filed: 12/17/2007, Entered: 12/17/2007 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5746 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007 Order on Motion to Extend Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5745 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007 Order on Motion to Extend Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5744 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: 12/13/2007 Certificate of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5743 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: 12/13/2007 Certificate of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5742 Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: 12/11/2007 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5741 Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: 12/11/2007 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5740 Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: 12/10/2007 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5739 Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: 12/4/2007 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5738 Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: 12/4/2007 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5737 Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: 12/4/2007 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5736 Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: 12/4/2007 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5735 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: 12/3/2007 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5734 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: 12/3/2007 Motion to Amend (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5733 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 11/30/2007 Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5732 Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: 11/29/2007 Notice of Withdrawal (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5731 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: 11/28/2007 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5730 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: 11/28/2007 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5729 Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: 11/28/2007 Minute Entry
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5728 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: 11/28/2007 Order on Motion to Dismiss Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5727 Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: 11/27/2007 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5726 Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: 11/27/2007 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5725 Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: 11/27/2007 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5724 Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: 11/27/2007 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5723 Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: 11/27/2007 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5722 Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: 11/27/2007 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5721 Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: 11/27/2007 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5720 Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: 11/27/2007 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5719 Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: 11/27/2007 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5718 Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: 11/27/2007 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5717 Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: 11/27/2007 Order on Motion to Abandon
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5716 Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: 11/27/2007 Order on Motion to Extend Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5715 Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: 11/27/2007 Order on Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5714 Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: 11/26/2007 Notice of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5713 Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: 11/26/2007 Certificate of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5712 Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: 11/26/2007 Transfer/Assignment of Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5711 Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: 11/26/2007 Transfer/Assignment of Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5710 Filed: 11/21/2007, Entered: 11/21/2007 Certificate of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5709 Filed: 11/21/2007, Entered: 11/21/2007 Certificate of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5708 Filed: 11/21/2007, Entered: 11/21/2007 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5707 Filed: 11/21/2007, Entered: 11/21/2007 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5706 Filed: 11/21/2007, Entered: 11/21/2007 Notice of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5705 Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5704 Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5703 Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 Motion to Extend (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5702 Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 Motion to Extend (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5701 Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 Order Setting Omnibus Hearing Dates
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5700 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5699 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5698 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 Notice of Submission of Proof of Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5697 Filed: 11/12/2007, Entered: 11/12/2007 Motion to Extend (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5696 Filed: 11/9/2007, Entered: 11/9/2007 Motion to Amend (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5695 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: 11/1/2007 Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5694 Filed: 10/30/2007, Entered: 10/30/2007 Notice of Withdrawal (A)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5693 Filed: 10/26/2007, Entered: 10/26/2007 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5692 Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: 10/25/2007 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5691 Filed: 10/23/2007, Entered: 10/23/2007 Hearing Cancelled/Rescheduled. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5690 Filed: 10/22/2007, Entered: 10/22/2007 Post-Confirmation Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5689 Filed: 10/22/2007, Entered: 10/22/2007 Post-Confirmation Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5688 Filed: 10/22/2007, Entered: 10/22/2007 Post-Confirmation Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5687 Filed: 10/22/2007, Entered: 10/22/2007 Notice of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5686 Filed: 10/18/2007, Entered: 10/19/2007 Hearing Held/Court Sign-In Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5685 Filed: 10/18/2007, Entered: 10/18/2007 Autodocket of credit card
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5684 Filed: 10/18/2007, Entered: 10/18/2007 Motion to Abandon
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5683 Filed: 10/18/2007, Entered: 10/18/2007 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5682 Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: 10/17/2007 Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5681 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007 Notice of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5680 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5679 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: 10/12/2007 Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5678 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: 10/10/2007 Notice of Submission of Proof of Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5677 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: 10/9/2007 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5676 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: 10/4/2007 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5675 Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: 10/3/2007 Certification of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5674 Filed: 9/27/2007, Entered: 9/27/2007 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5673 Filed: 9/27/2007, Entered: 9/27/2007 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5672 Filed: 9/27/2007, Entered: 9/27/2007 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5671 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: 9/26/2007 Approving settlement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5670 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: 9/26/2007 Hearing Cancelled/Rescheduled. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5669 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007 Notice of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (B)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5668 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: 9/24/2007 Certificate of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5667 Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: 9/13/2007 Notice of Submission of Proof of Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5666 Filed: 9/7/2007, Entered: 9/7/2007 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5665 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: 9/5/2007 Motion to Approve Settlement (A)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5664 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: 8/31/2007 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5663 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: 8/31/2007 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5662 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: 8/31/2007 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5661 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: 8/31/2007 Affidavit/Declaration of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 268 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?