Where 2 Get It, Inc. v. Geo Tag Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:11-cv-00223
District Judge Richard G. Andrews, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 29, 2016 at 4:33 PM EST (5.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Where 2 Get It, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Polk & Wardwell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Jacob Schwartz +1 212 450 4581 +1 212 450 3581 daniel.schwartz@dpw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stamatios Stamoulis +1 212 326 2000

Represented by Stamoulis & Weinblatt LLC

v.
No Logo Geotag Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher M. Joe joec@gtlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McKool Smith, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric W. Buether +1 214 978 4000

Toggle Switch Represented by Phillips, Goldman & Spence, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/28/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian E. Farnan +1 302 655 4200 bef@pgslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Laurence Dorsney +1 302 984 6087 kdorsney@potteranderson.com
No Logo The Nielsen Company (us), LLC, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donald E. Reid +1 302 658 9200 dreid@mnat.com
No Logo Wilke Thornton, Inc., Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donald E. Reid +1 302 658 9200 dreid@mnat.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1338
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (33) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/21/2012, Entered: None
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT that case transferred from Delaware has been opened in Eastern District of Texas as case 2:12-cv-00149. (dab) (Entered: 03/21/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 32 Filed: 3/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER Denying 21 MOTION to Intervene filed; Denying 11 MOTION to Dismiss, and GRANTING MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of Texas. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/6/2012. (nms) (Entered: 03/06/2012)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: None
      MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Gregory L. Lippetz - filed by The Nielsen Company (US), LLC. (Reid, Donald) (Entered: 03/05/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/17/2012, Entered: None
        REQUEST for Oral Argument by The Nielsen Company (US), LLC, Wilke Thornton, Inc. re 21 MOTION to Intervene. (Reid, Donald) (Entered: 01/17/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 29 Filed: 1/9/2012, Entered: None
          REPLY BRIEF re 21 MOTION to Intervene filed by The Nielsen Company (US), LLC, Wilke Thornton, Inc.. (Reid, Donald) (Entered: 01/09/2012)
            LREF
            Blank 28 Filed: 12/29/2011, Entered: None
            DECLARATION of Eric C. Buether re 27 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Geo Tag Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth) Modified on 12/30/2011 (nms). (Entered: 12/29/2011)
              LREF
              Blank 27 Filed: 12/29/2011, Entered: None
              ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 21 MOTION to Intervene of Nielsen Company (US), LLC and Wilke Thorton, Inc. filed by Geo Tag Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 1/9/2012. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 12/29/2011)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/28/2011, Entered: None
                Second STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Reponse to Motion to Intervene to January 3, 2011 - filed by Geo Tag Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 12/28/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/27/2011, Entered: None
                  STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to reply to Motion to Intervene to December 28, 2011 - filed by Geo Tag Inc., The Nielsen Company (US), LLC, Wilke Thornton, Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 12/27/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None
                    APPENDIX re 21 MOTION to Intervene Appendix of Authorities in the Nielsen Company (US), LLC and Wilke Thornton, Inc.s Motion to Intervene by The Nielsen Company (US), LLC, Wilke Thornton, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Tabs 1-5)(Reid, Donald) (Entered: 12/07/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None
                      DECLARATION re 21 MOTION to Intervene Declaration of Gregory L. Pippetz in Support of the Nielsen Company (US), LLC and Wilke Thornton, Inc.s Motion to Intervene by The Nielsen Company (US), LLC, Wilke Thornton, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-E)(Reid, Donald) (Entered: 12/07/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank 22 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None
                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 21 MOTION to Intervene Memorandum of Law in Support of the Nielsen Company (US), LLC and Wilke Thornton, Inc.s Motion to Intervene filed by The Nielsen Company (US), LLC, Wilke Thornson, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 12/27/2011. (Reid, Donald) (Entered: 12/07/2011)
                          LREF
                          Blank 21 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None
                          MOTION to Intervene - filed by The Nielsen Company (US), LLC, Wilke Thornson, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Reid, Donald) (Entered: 12/07/2011)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None
                            MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eric Buether and Chris Joe - filed by Geo Tag Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: None
                              REQUEST for Oral Argument by Where 2 Get It, Inc. re 11 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon the Declaratory Judgment Act, or, in the Alternative MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of Texas. (Weinblatt, Richard) (Entered: 07/14/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank 18 Filed: 7/7/2011, Entered: None
                                DECLARATION re 17 Reply Brief Declaration of Lawrence P. Howorth by Geo Tag Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/07/2011)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 17 Filed: 7/7/2011, Entered: None
                                  REPLY BRIEF re 11 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon the Declaratory Judgment Act, or, in the Alternative MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of Texas filed by Geo Tag Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/07/2011)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/29/2011, Entered: None
                                    MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joseph R. Lanser and Matthew A. Werber - filed by Where 2 Get It, Inc.. (Weinblatt, Richard) (Entered: 06/29/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/28/2011, Entered: None
                                      STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file reply in support of Motion to Dismiss or Transfer (DI 11) to July 7, 2011 - filed by Geo Tag Inc., Where 2 Get It, Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank 14 Filed: 6/20/2011, Entered: None
                                        ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 11 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon the Declaratory Judgment Act, or, in the Alternative MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of Texas filed by Where 2 Get It, Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 6/30/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Manish Patel, # 2 Exhibit A: Unpublished Opinions)(Weinblatt, Richard) (Entered: 06/20/2011)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: None
                                          STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Oppose Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint For Declaratory Judgment, Or, In The Alternative, To Transfer Venue (D.I. 11) to June 20, 2011 - filed by Where 2 Get It, Inc.. (Weinblatt, Richard) (Entered: 06/06/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Blank 12 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None
                                            OPENING BRIEF in Support re 11 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon the Declaratory Judgment Act, or, in the Alternative MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of Texas filed by Geo Tag Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/6/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 05/20/2011)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                              MOTION to Dismiss Based upon the Declaratory Judgment Act, or, in the Alternative, MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of Texas - filed by Geo Tag Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 05/20/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Where 2 Get It, Inc.. (Weinblatt, Richard) (Entered: 05/13/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                  MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daniel J. Schwartz - filed by Where 2 Get It, Inc.. (Weinblatt, Richard) (Entered: 05/13/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Julie S. Turner and Rachael D. Lamkin as co-counsel. Reason for request: No Longer Representing Plaintiff In This Matter. (Weinblatt, Richard) (Entered: 05/13/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re Geo Tag Inc.: Entry of appearance of attorney Kenneth Laurence Dorsney. Attorney Brian E. Farnan and Farnan LLP terminated. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/28/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                        STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER or otherwise respond to the Complaint to 5/20/2011 - filed by Geo Tag Inc.. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/13/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Where 2 Get It, Inc.. Geo Tag Inc. served on 3/30/2011, answer due 4/20/2011. (Weinblatt, Richard) (Entered: 03/31/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                            MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Julie S. Turner and Rachel D. Lamkin - filed by Where 2 Get It, Inc. (rwc) Modified on 3/15/2011 (rwc). (Main Document 4 replaced on 3/17/2011) (lid). (Entered: 03/15/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                              Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 5,930,474. (rwc) (Entered: 03/15/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (rwc) (Entered: 03/15/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                  COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Geo Tag Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350.00, receipt number #0311-860586.) - filed by Where 2 Get It, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(rwc) (Entered: 03/15/2011)
                                                                    LREF

                                                                    Statistics

                                                                    This case has been viewed 229 times.

                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                    Space
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                     
                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                    Need Password Help?