Kickapoo Run LLC v. Netsmart Technologies Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:11-cv-00839
District Judge Renee Marie Bumb, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 25, 2016 at 7:17 AM ST (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Kickapoo Run, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by MACCARTER & ENGLISH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Anthony Walker, III +1 302 984 6358 pwalker@mccarter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McCarter & English LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael P. Kelly +1 302 984 6301 +1 302 984 6399 mkelly@mccarter.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel M. Silver +1 302 984 6300 dsilver@mccarter.com
No Logo Athenahealth, Inc., Counter-Claimant
Unknown Role, Maria Health Inc
No Logo Netsmart Technologies, Inc., Counter-Claimant
v.
No Logo Credible Wireless, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Defran Systems, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Icanotes LLC, Defendant
No Logo Mathemedics Inc., Defendant
No Logo MDland International Corp., Defendant
No Logo Psytech Solutions Inc., Defendant
No Logo Qualifacts Systems, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/14/2012, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Grey +1 302 777 4200 +1 302 777 4224 jgrey@crosslaw.com
No Logo Webmd Health Corp., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/14/2012, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard L. Horwitz +1 302 984 6000 rhorwitz@potteranderson.com
No Logo Webmd LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/14/2012, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard L. Horwitz +1 302 984 6000 rhorwitz@potteranderson.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (54) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/3/2012, Entered: None
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 5,961,332. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation of Dismissal)(nms) (Entered: 07/03/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
    SO ORDERED Granting 52 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice, filed by Kickapoo Run LLC (***Civil Case Terminated). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/3/2012. (nms) (Entered: 07/03/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/3/2012, Entered: None
      STIPULATION of Dismissal of Netsmart Technologies, Inc. by Kickapoo Run LLC. (Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 07/03/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER Granting 50 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice, filed by Kickapoo Run LLC and Athenahealth Inc. (Athenahealth Inc. terminated). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/27/2012. (nms) (Entered: 06/27/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/25/2012, Entered: None
          STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice of Athenahealth, Inc. by Kickapoo Run LLC. (Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 06/25/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
            Order Setting Rule 16(b) Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 7/9/2012, at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/1/2012. (nms) (Entered: 05/02/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None
              NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kickapoo Run LLC as to Credible Wireless, Inc. (Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 04/27/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/10/2012, Entered: None
                STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Credible Wireless Inc to Answer Complaint to April 20, 2012 - filed by Kickapoo Run LLC. (Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 04/10/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None
                  STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Credible Wireless to Respond to Complaint to April 9, 2012 - filed by Credible Wireless Inc., Kickapoo Run LLC. (Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/21/2012, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kickapoo Run LLC as to ICANotes LLC (Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 03/21/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: None
                      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kickapoo Run LLC as to Psytech Solutions, Inc. (Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 03/14/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: None
                        NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kickapoo Run LLC as to WebMD Health Corp and WebMD LLC (Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 03/14/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/24/2012, Entered: None
                          ANSWER to 34 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, by Kickapoo Run LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 02/24/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/24/2012, Entered: None
                            ANSWER to 32 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, by Kickapoo Run LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 02/24/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: None
                              STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Credible Wireless to Answer complaint to March 26, 2012 - filed by Kickapoo Run LLC. (Walker, Patrick) (Entered: 02/23/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: None
                                STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ICANotes, LLC to Answer Complaint to March 15, 2012 - filed by Kickapoo Run LLC. (Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 02/23/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: None
                                  STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to March 2, 2012 - filed by WEBMD LLC, WebMD Health Corp.. (Horwitz, Richard) (Entered: 02/17/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kickapoo Run LLC as to Qualifacts Systems, Inc. (Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 02/14/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: None
                                      STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to Complaint to February 17, 2012 - filed by Kickapoo Run LLC, WEBMD LLC, WebMD Health Corp.. (Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 02/03/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: None
                                        Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Netsmart Technologies Inc.. (Keller, Karen) (Entered: 02/03/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: None
                                          ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against Kickapoo Run LLC by Netsmart Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 1 of 9, # 2 2 of 9, # 3 3 of 9, # 4 4 of 9, # 5 5 of 9, # 6 6 of 9, # 7 7 of 9, # 8 8 of 9, # 9 9 of 9)(Keller, Karen) (Entered: 02/03/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: None
                                            Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Athenahealth Inc.. (Keller, Karen) (Entered: 02/03/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: None
                                              ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against Kickapoo Run LLC by Athenahealth Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 1 of 9, # 2 2 of 9, # 3 3 of 9, # 4 4 of 9, # 5 5 of 9, # 6 6 of 9, # 7 7 of 9, # 8 8 of 9, # 9 9 of 9)(Keller, Karen) (Entered: 02/03/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for PsyTech to Answer the Complaint to February 24, 2012 - filed by Kickapoo Run LLC. (Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 02/03/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                  STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Kickapoo to respond to Qualifacts Combined Motion to Sever for Improper Joinder and to Transfer Venue to February 17, 2012 - filed by Kickapoo Run LLC. (Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 02/03/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                    STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ICANotes, LLC to Answer Complaint to February 23, 2012 - filed by Kickapoo Run LLC. (Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                      STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer complaint to February 24, 2012 - filed by Credible Wireless Inc., Kickapoo Run LLC. (Walker, Patrick) (Entered: 01/26/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                        STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to February 3, 2012 - filed by WEBMD LLC, WebMD Health Corp.. (Horwitz, Richard) (Entered: 01/20/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                          MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael A. Albert and Hunter D. Keeton - filed by Athenahealth Inc., Netsmart Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Keller, Karen) (Entered: 01/19/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                            STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to Defendant Qualifacts Systems Inc.'s Combined Motion to Sever for Improper Joinder and to Transfer Venue to February 3, 2012 - filed by Kickapoo Run LLC. (Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 01/19/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kickapoo Run LLC as to MDLand International Corporation (Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 01/19/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kickapoo Run LLC. WebMD Health Corp. served on 12/30/2011, answer due 1/20/2012. (Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 01/04/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kickapoo Run LLC. WEBMD LLC served on 12/30/2011, answer due 1/20/2012. (Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 01/04/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re 20 MOTION to Sever for Improper Joinder and to Transfer Venue, filed by Qualifacts Systems Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/20/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Grey, Joseph) Modified on 1/4/2012 (nms). (Entered: 01/03/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                      MOTION to Sever for Improper Joinder and to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee - filed by Qualifacts Systems Inc.. (Grey, Joseph) (Main Document 20 replaced on 1/4/2012) (nms). Modified on 1/4/2012 (nms). (Entered: 01/03/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                        STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Respond to Complaint to January 3, 2012 - filed by Qualifacts Systems Inc.. (Grey, Joseph) (Entered: 12/30/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                          STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Psytech Solutions Inc. to ANSWER complaint to February 3, 2012 - filed by Kickapoo Run LLC. (Walker, Patrick) (Entered: 12/30/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                            Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, plead or otherwise respond to the Complaint to February 3, 2012 - filed by Kickapoo Run LLC, Netsmart Technologies Inc.. (Keller, Karen) (Entered: 12/29/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                              Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, plead or otherwise respond to the Complaint to February 3, 2012 - filed by Athenahealth Inc., Kickapoo Run LLC. (Keller, Karen) (Entered: 12/29/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ICANotes to Answer complaint to February 2, 2012 - filed by Kickapoo Run LLC. (Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 12/29/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                  NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kickapoo Run LLC as to Defran Systems, Inc (Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 12/23/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                    MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Hao Ni, Stevenson Moore and Timothy Wang - filed by Kickapoo Run LLC. (Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 12/22/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kickapoo Run LLC. Psytech Solutions Inc. served on 12/9/2011, answer due 12/30/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - B)(Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 12/14/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kickapoo Run LLC. Icanotes LLC served on 12/9/2011, answer due 12/30/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - B)(Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 12/14/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kickapoo Run LLC. Qualifacts Systems Inc. served on 12/9/2011, answer due 12/30/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - B)(Silver, Daniel) Modified on 12/14/2011 (ksr, ). (Entered: 12/14/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kickapoo Run LLC. Netsmart Technologies Inc. served on 12/12/2011, answer due 1/3/2012. (Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 12/14/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kickapoo Run LLC. MDland International Corp. served on 12/12/2011, answer due 1/3/2012. (Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 12/14/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kickapoo Run LLC. Credible Wireless Inc. served on 12/9/2011, answer due 12/30/2011. (Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 12/14/2011)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kickapoo Run LLC. Athenahealth Inc. served on 12/9/2011, answer due 12/30/2011. (Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 12/14/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/3/2011, Entered: 11/3/2011 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                                                                                                    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kickapoo Run LLC as to Mathemedics, Inc. (Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/16/2011, Entered: 9/19/2011 Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                      Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Kickapoo Run LLC. (els) (Entered: 09/19/2011)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/16/2011, Entered: 9/19/2011 Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner
                                                                                                        Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 5,961,332;. (els) (Entered: 09/19/2011)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/16/2011, Entered: 9/19/2011 Magistrate Consent FormsCourt Filing
                                                                                                          Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (els) (Entered: 09/19/2011)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 9/16/2011, Entered: 9/19/2011 Complaint
                                                                                                            COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Athenahealth Inc., Credible Wireless Inc., Defran Systems Inc., Icanotes LLC, MDland International Corp., Mathmedics Inc., Netsmart Technologies Inc., Psytech Solutions Inc., Qualifacts Systems Inc., WEBMD LLC, WebMD Health Corp. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0311-946457.) - filed by Kickapoo Run LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(els) Modified on 9/22/2011 (dzs, ). (Entered: 09/19/2011)
                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 230 times.

                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                               
                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                              Need Password Help?