Intellectual Ventures I LLC et al v. Motorola Mobility LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:11-cv-00908
District Judge Sue L. Robinson, presiding

Tags
Last Updated August 1, 2017 at 9:12 AM DT (4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Intellectual Ventures, Inc., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Intellectual Ventures I LLC"

Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Farnan LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rosemary Jean Piergiovanni +1 302 777 0300 +1 302 777 0301 rpiergiovanni@farnanlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ian N. Feinberg +1 650 331 2000 +1 650 331 2060 ifeinberg@mayerbrown.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Phillips, Goldman & Spence, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian E. Farnan +1 302 655 4200 bef@pgslaw.com
No Logo Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Farnan LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rosemary Jean Piergiovanni +1 302 777 0300 +1 302 777 0301 rpiergiovanni@farnanlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Phillips, Goldman & Spence, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian E. Farnan +1 302 655 4200 bef@pgslaw.com
v.
Motorola Mobility, Inc. Motorola Mobility, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (471) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 472 Filed: 10/12/2015, Entered: None
Amended Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Lenovo Group Limited for Motorola Mobility LLC filed by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 10/12/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 471 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: None
    REDACTED VERSION of 432 Exhibit to a Document -- Exhibit 9 to Motorola Mobility LLC's Notice of Lodging Trial Demonstratives -- by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 06/24/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 470 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: None
      REPLY BRIEF re 449 MOTION to Strike Improper Lodging of Demonstrative Exhibits filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 06/11/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 469 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: None
        REPLY BRIEF re 444 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on the '462 Patent filed by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 06/08/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 468 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: None
          REPLY BRIEF re 442 MOTION for New Trial on the '462 Patent filed by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 06/08/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 467 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None
            DECLARATION re 466 Reply Brief, of Nickolas Bohl by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 06/01/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 466 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None
              [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re 438 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law [Plaintiffs' Rule 50(b) Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law as to the '450 Patent] filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 06/01/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 465 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None
                RESPONSE to Motion re 449 MOTION to Strike Improper Lodging of Demonstrative Exhibits - Motorola's Opposition to Intellectual Ventures' Motion to Strike Lodging of Demonstrative Exhibits filed by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 06/01/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 464 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None
                  Joint STIPULATION Extending Briefing Deadlines re 442 MOTION for New Trial on the '462 Patent, 444 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on the '462 Patent by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 06/01/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 463 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None
                    REPLY BRIEF re 436 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on the '144 Patent filed by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 05/29/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 462 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None
                      REPLY BRIEF re 433 MOTION for New Trial on the '144 Patent filed by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 05/29/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 461 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None
                        REDACTED VERSION of 459 Declaration, of Michael J. Farnan by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-B)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/29/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 460 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: None
                          REDACTED VERSION of 453 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 05/26/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 459 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: None
                            [SEALED] DECLARATION re 458 Answering Brief in Opposition of Michael J. Farnan by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B - Part 1 of 2, # 3 Exhibit B - Part 2 of 2)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/22/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 458 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: None
                              ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 442 MOTION for New Trial on the '462 Patent filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 6/1/2015. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/22/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 457 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: None
                                ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 444 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on the '462 Patent filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 6/1/2015. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/22/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 456 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: None
                                  REDACTED VERSION of 452 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/22/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 455 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: None
                                    REDACTED VERSION of 451 Declaration of Nickolas Bohl by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-4)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/22/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 454 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: None
                                      REDACTED VERSION of 450 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/22/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 453 Filed: 5/18/2015, Entered: None
                                        [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 438 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law [Plaintiffs' Rule 50(b) Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law as to the '450 Patent] filed by Motorola Mobility LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 5/29/2015. (Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 05/18/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 452 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None
                                          [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 436 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on the '144 Patent filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 5/26/2015. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/15/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 451 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None
                                            [SEALED] DECLARATION re 450 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 05/15/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 450 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None
                                              [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 433 MOTION for New Trial on the '144 Patent filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 5/26/2015. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 05/15/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 449 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                MOTION to Strike Improper Lodging of Demonstrative Exhibits - filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 05/15/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Blank 448 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                  Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME regarding post-trial briefing deadlines to various (see stipulation) - filed by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 05/12/2015)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 447 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                    STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME (i) for Plaintiffs to Respond to Defendant's Rule 59(a) Motion for a New Trial on the '144 Patent and Defendant's Rule 50(b) Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on the '144 Patent and (ii) for Defendant to file their Reply Briefs to (i) 5/15/2015 and (ii) 5/29/2015 - filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/05/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 446 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                      REDACTED VERSION of 443 Opening Brief in Support, by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - C)(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 04/29/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 445 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                        OPENING BRIEF in Support re 444 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on the '462 Patent filed by Motorola Mobility LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/18/2015. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 04/29/2015)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 444 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                          MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on the '462 Patent - filed by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 04/29/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 443 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                            [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re 442 MOTION for New Trial on the '462 Patent filed by Motorola Mobility LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/18/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - C)(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 04/29/2015)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 442 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                              MOTION for New Trial on the '462 Patent - filed by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 04/29/2015)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 441 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                REDACTED VERSION of 435 Declaration of Joshua L. Sohn by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 04/28/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 440 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                  DECLARATION re 439 Opening Brief in Support, of Nickolas Bohl by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/27/2015)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 439 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                    OPENING BRIEF in Support re 438 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law [Plaintiffs' Rule 50(b) Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law as to the '450 Patent] filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/14/2015. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/27/2015)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                      MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law [Plaintiffs' Rule 50(b) Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law as to the '450 Patent] - filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/27/2015)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 437 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                        OPENING BRIEF in Support re 436 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on the '144 Patent filed by Motorola Mobility LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/11/2015. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 04/22/2015)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 436 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                          MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on the '144 Patent - filed by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 04/22/2015)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 435 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                            [SEALED] DECLARATION re 433 MOTION for New Trial on the '144 Patent by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Part 1, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Part 2)(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 04/22/2015)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 434 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                              OPENING BRIEF in Support re 433 MOTION for New Trial on the '144 Patent filed by Motorola Mobility LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/11/2015. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 04/22/2015)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                MOTION for New Trial on the '144 Patent - filed by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 04/22/2015)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                  [SEALED] EXHIBIT re 431 Notice (Other), Exhibit 9 to Motorola Mobility LLC's Notice of Lodging of Trial Demonstratives by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 04/13/2015)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                    NOTICE of Motorola Mobility LLC's Notice of Lodging of Trial Demonstratives by Motorola Mobility LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3 and 4, # 4 Exhibit 5, # 5 Exhibits 6-8, # 6 Exhibit 9, # 7 Exhibits10-11, # 8 Exhibit 12)(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 04/13/2015)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                      REDACTED VERSION of 403 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix 1 - 5)(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 04/01/2015)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Blank 429 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        JUDGMENT FOLLOWING A JURY VERDICT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 58(b). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 4/1/2015. (fms) (Entered: 04/01/2015)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                          Exhibit Lists for the Jury Trial held on 3/26/2015-3/27/2015 and 3/30/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Joint List, # 2 Plaintiffs' List, # 3 Defendant's List)(fms) (Entered: 03/30/2015)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                            [SEALED] Jury Note. (fms) (Entered: 03/30/2015)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                              [SEALED] Jury List. (fms) (Entered: 03/30/2015)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                REDACTED VERSION of 424 Jury Verdict. (fms) (Entered: 03/30/2015)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                  [SEALED] JURY VERDICT. (fms) (Entered: 03/30/2015)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    Final Jury Instructions (Read in open court by Judge Robinson on 3/30/2015). (fms) (Entered: 03/30/2015)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 422 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                      MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law - filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/30/2015)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 421 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        JUDGMENT Following a Jury Verdict Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 58(b). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/30/2015. (fms) (Entered: 03/30/2015)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 420 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                          MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law - filed by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 03/30/2015)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                            ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of PTX 42, 45, 48, and 64. Acknowledgment filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (fms) (Entered: 03/26/2015)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 418 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Proposed Jury Instructions by Motorola Mobility LLC Final Jury Instructions. (Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 03/26/2015)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 417 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                Preliminary Jury Instructions (Read in open court by Judge Robinson on 3/26/2015). (fms) Modified on 3/26/2015 (fms). (Entered: 03/26/2015)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 416 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  Voir Dire to the Jury Panel (Read in open court by Judge Robinson on 3/26/2015). (fms) Modified on 3/26/2015 (fms). (Entered: 03/26/2015)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    [SEALED] Jury Notes. (fms) (Entered: 03/25/2015)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 414 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Exhibit List for Jury Trial Held on 3/16/2015-3/19/2015, 3/23/2015-3/25/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Joint Exhibit List, # 2 Plaintiffs' Exhibit List, # 3 Defendant's Exhibit List)(fms) (Entered: 03/25/2015)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 413 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        [SEALED] Jury List. (fms) (Entered: 03/25/2015)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 412 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          REDACTED VERSION of 411 Jury Verdict. (fms) (Entered: 03/25/2015)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 411 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            [SEALED] JURY VERDICT. (fms) (Entered: 03/25/2015)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              VERDICT SHEET by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC regarding '462 Patent. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER denying 408 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/25/2015. (nmfn) (Entered: 03/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 408 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Stay Proceedings on the '462 Patent - filed by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 03/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    Final Jury Instructions (Read in open court by Judge Robinson on 3/24/2015). (fms) (Entered: 03/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law - filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Invalidity - filed by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 03/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          REDACTED VERSION of 391 Letter by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            [SEALED] MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law - filed by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix 1 - 5)(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 3/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              STATEMENT -- Defendant's Submission Concerning Defenses and Prior Art -- by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 03/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                Preliminary Jury Instructions (Read in open court by Judge Robinson on 3/16/2015). (fms) (Entered: 03/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  Voir Dire to the Jury Panel (Read in open court by Judge Robinson on 3/16/2015). (fms) (Entered: 03/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 399 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    VERDICT SHEET by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC . (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Jury Instructions by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC [Final Jury Instructions]. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Exhibit List [Plaintiffs'] by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 396 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Exhibit List [Joint] by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Exhibit List by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 03/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 394 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re: pretrial issues. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/13/2015. (nmfn) (Entered: 03/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                REDACTED VERSION of 389 Letter by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A & B)(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 03/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  REDACTED VERSION of 390 Letter by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix 1 & 2)(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 03/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Brian E. Farnan regarding Defendant's March 10, 2015 Letter Concerning Licenses - re 389 Letter. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding IV's infringement theories for the '144 Patent. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix 1, # 2 Appendix 2)(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 03/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding lack of nexus. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 03/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding the testimony of Dr. Drabik. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 03/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 387 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding doctrine of equivalents. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 03/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 386 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant's Final List of Trial Witnesses for U.S. Patent No. 7,120,462 (Revised) and (2) Defendant's Final List of Trial Witnesses for U.S. Patent Nos. 7,810,144 and 7,409,450 (Revised) filed by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 03/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Brian E. Farnan regarding Submission Requested by the Court during Pretrial Conference. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 3/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant's Final List of Trial Witnesses for U.S. Patent No. 7,120,462 and (2) Defendant's Final List of Trial Witnesses for U.S. Patent Nos. 7,810,144 and 7,409,450 filed by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 03/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Brian E. Farnan regarding Exhibits 13 and 14 of the Proposed Pretrial Order. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of plaintiffs' trial exhibits PTX 314 and PTX 315. Acknowledgment filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (fms) (Entered: 02/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Michael J. Farnan regarding Requesting Return of Trial Exhibits marked PTX314 and PTX315. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 02/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, Rescheduling Hearings( The Final Pretrial Conference is rescheduled for 3/2/2015 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson.). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 2/25/2015. (nmfn) (Entered: 02/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 2/24/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting in part and denying in part 360 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity and Indefiniteness. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 2/24/2015. (nmfn) (Entered: 02/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 2/24/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 2/24/2015. (nmfn) (Entered: 02/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 2/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Voir Dire by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 2/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Jury Instructions by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC (Preliminary Jury Instructions - '144 and '450 Patents). (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 2/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Voir Dire by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 2/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Jury Instructions by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC (Preliminary Jury Instructions - '462 and '054 Patents). (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jing Hu, Ph.D. on February 20, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. (AMENDED) filed by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 02/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Pretrial Order Concerning U.S. Patent Nos. 7,120,462 and 6,557,054 by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14)(Farnan, Brian) (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/24/2015) (nmfn, ). (Entered: 02/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Pretrial Order Concering U.S. Patent Nos. 7,810,144 and 7,409,450 by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14)(Farnan, Brian) (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/24/2015) (nmfn, ). (Entered: 02/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Notice Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 282 filed by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 02/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jing Hu, Ph.D. on February 20, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. filed by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 02/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY BRIEF on Patent Eligibility and Indefiniteness filed by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 02/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove William H. Boice as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer associated with Kilpatrick Townsend. (Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 01/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re: claim construction. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 1/30/2015. (nmfn) (Entered: 01/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding term construction - re 356 Notice (Other). (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 01/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REDACTED VERSION of 363 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-F)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition [Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motorola's Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment] filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 2/5/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REDACTED VERSION of 360 Statement -- Defendant's Supplemental Brief on Patent Elibibility and Indfiniteness -- by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 01/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Stephen J. Kraftschik regarding requesting the return of physical trial exhibits. (Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 01/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  [SEALED] STATEMENT -- Defendant's Supplemental Brief on Patent Elibibility and Indfiniteness -- by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-4)(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 01/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROPOSED ORDER Trial Scheduling Order by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 1/6/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter to Counsel from Judge Robinson - re 356 Notice of Outstanding Matters to be Addressed. The telephone conference scheduled for today is cancelled. (nmfn) (Entered: 01/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 1/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David A. Nelson, David A. Perlson, Patrick D. Curran, and Joshua L. Sohn - filed by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 01/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Outstanding Matters to be Addressed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of plaintiffs' trial exhibits PTX 1 - PTX 73. Acknowledgment filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (fms) Modified on 12/19/2014 (fms). (Entered: 12/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 12/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Michael J. Farnan regarding Return of Trial Exhibits. (Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 12/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mitchell G. Stockwell - filed by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 11/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORAL ORDER: A teleconference has been scheduled for 11/13/14 at 10:30 AM EASTERN TIME with Judge Thynge. Counsel for Intellectual Ventures shall initiate the teleconference call. Ordered by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 11/12/14. (cak) (Entered: 11/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 11/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Supplemental NOTICE of Concurrent Proceedings (Second Supplemental) by Motorola Mobility LLC re 346 Notice (Other), 332 Notice (Other) (Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 11/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 350 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting in part and denying in part 319 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Renewed filed by Motorola Mobility LLC. ORDER Setting Teleconference: ( A Telephone Conference is set for 11/12/2014 at 11:00 AM before Judge Sue L. Robinson). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 10/28/2014. (nmfn) (Entered: 10/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 10/28/2014. (nmfn) (Entered: 10/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORAL ORDER re 331 Order Setting Mediation Conferences. The mediation is rescheduled to 11/20/14 beginning at 9:30 AM with Judge Thynge. Dress is business casual. Submissions of the parties shall now be due on 11/10/14. All other provisions of the Court's 4/24/14 Order remain in full force and effect. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 8/4/14. (cak) (Entered: 08/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORAL ORDER: The mediation scheduled for 8/26/14 at 10:00 AM with Judge Thynge is cancelled and will be rescheduled at a later date. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 7/30/14. (cak) (Entered: 07/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 346 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Supplemental NOTICE of Concurrent Proceedings by Motorola Mobility LLC (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                [SEALED] Transcript of jury trial held on February 5, 2014 before Judge Robinson.. (vjg) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Redaction of 343 Transcript. (vjg) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    [SEALED] Transcript of jury trial held on February 4, 2014 before Judge Robinson.. (vjg) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Official Transcript of Jury trial held on February 3, 2014 before Judge Robinson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Valerie Gunning,Telephone number (302) 573-6194. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/11/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/23/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/19/2014. (vjg) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Redaction of 340 Transcript. (vjg) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          [SEALED] Transcript of jury trial held on January 31, 2014 before Judge Robinson.. (vjg) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Redaction of 338 Transcript. (vjg) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              [SEALED] Transcript of jury trial held on January 30, 2014 before Judge Robinson.. (vjg) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Official Transcript of jury trial held on January 29, 2014 before Judge Robinson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Valerie Gunning,Telephone number (302) 573-6194. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/11/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/23/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/19/2014. (vjg) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Official Transcript of jury trial held on January 28, 2014 before Judge Robinson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Valerie Gunning,Telephone number (302) 573-6194. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/11/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/23/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/19/2014. (vjg) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Official Transcript of jury trial held on January 27, 2014 before Judge Robinson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Valerie Gunning,Telephone number (302) 573-6194. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/11/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/23/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/19/2014. (vjg) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Official Transcript of jury trial held on January 24, 2014 before Judge Robinson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Valerie Gunning,Telephone number (302) 573-6194. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/11/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/23/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/19/2014. (vjg) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Official Transcript of jury trial held on January 23, 2014 before Judge Robinson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Valerie Gunning,Telephone number (302) 573-6194. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/11/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/23/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/19/2014. (vjg) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Concurrent Proceedings by Motorola Mobility LLC (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Setting Mediation Conferences: A Mediation Conference is set for 8/26/2014 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 2B before Judge Mary Pat Thynge. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 4/24/14. (cak) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY BRIEF re 319 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Renewed filed by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REDACTED VERSION of 325 Declaration, of Nickolas Bohl by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-6)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REDACTED VERSION of 324 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, Setting Hearings( An Oral Argument is set for 4/23/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Sue L. Robinson.). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 4/2/2014. (nmfn) (Entered: 04/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Matthew Powers - filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        [SEALED] DECLARATION re 324 Answering Brief in Opposition, of Nickolas Bohl by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 319 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Renewed filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 4/7/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER setting briefing schedule re 319 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Renewed : Answering Brief due 3/28/2014. Reply Brief due 4/4/2014. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/13/2014. (nmfn) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REDACTED VERSION of 320 Opening Brief in Support by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 03/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPENDIX re 320 Opening Brief in Support of Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A through F (Part 1), # 2 Exhibits A through F (Part 2), # 3 Exhibits A through F (Part 3))(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re 319 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Renewed filed by Motorola Mobility LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/24/2014. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Renewed - filed by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      [SEALED] Jury Notes. (fms) (Entered: 02/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Exhibit Lists for the Jury Trial held - 1/23/2014-2/5/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiffs' List, # 2 Defendant's List, # 3 Final Admitted Exhibit List)(fms) (Entered: 02/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          [SEALED] Jury List. (fms) (Entered: 02/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 315 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER directing that jurors be provided lunch (cc: Finance). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 2/5/2014. (nmfn) (Entered: 02/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 314 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Final Jury Instructions (Read in open court by Judge Robinson on 2/4/2014). (fms) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law - filed by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law - filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Preliminary Jury Instructions (read in open court by Judge Robinson on 1/23/2014). (fms) (Entered: 01/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Voir Dire To Jury Panel (read in open court by Judge Robinson on 1/23/2014). (fms) Modified on 1/23/2014 (fms). (Entered: 01/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion re 308 MOTION for Reconsideration re 288 Order,, -- Motorola Mobility LLC's Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Sua Sponte Order Granting Summary Judgment and Proffer of Evidence - and MOTION to Strike the Improper Declaration of Mr. Grube from Motorola's Proffer of Evidence filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 308 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Reconsideration re 288 Order,, -- Motorola Mobility LLC's Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Sua Sponte Order Granting Summary Judgment and Proffer of Evidence - - filed by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit 1 & 2 to Exhibit A)(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 01/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Exhibit List -- Defendant's Exhibit List -- by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 1/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Seal Documents and Exclude Unauthorized Persons from the Courtroom [UNOPPOSED] - filed by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Poff, Adam) (Entered: 01/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 1/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint STATEMENT (Amended) Concering Asserted Patents, Defenses, and Prior Art by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 1/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Exhibit List (Corrected) by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 1/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Exhibit List (Joint) by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Exhibit List by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER that the parties shall be prepared to discuss the issue regarding Dr. Stewart's proposed testimony on Tuesday, January 21, 2014 at 8:30 a.m.. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 1/17/2014. (nmfn) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of Second Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Brian Von Herzen Regarding Noninfringement of U.S. Patent Nos. 6,557,054 and 6,658,464 filed by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 01/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Jury Instructions by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC (Revised). (Attachments: # 1 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Jury Instructions by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC . (Attachments: # 1 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATEMENT re 288 Order,, Regarding Admissibility of Dr. Stewart's Survey and Related Opinions by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATEMENT re 288 Order,, [Motorola Mobility LLC's Memorandum of Law Regarding Exclusion of the Report of Dr. David Stewart and Testimony Regarding the Same] by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A through C)(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Voir Dire by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint STATEMENT Concerning Asserted Patents, Defenses, and Prior Art by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        VERDICT SHEET by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC . (Attachments: # 1 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Jury Instructions by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC (Preliminary). (Attachments: # 1 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 289 MOTION For Clarification of the Court's January 8, 2014 Order . Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 1/14/2014. (nmfn) (Entered: 01/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Timothy Drabik Regarding Non-Infringement and Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 7,120,462 and (2) Supplemental Expert Report of Mark Seely Regarding Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 7,409,450 filed by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 01/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION For Clarification of the Court's January 8, 2014 Order - filed by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 01/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 288 Filed: 1/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER that the trial that begins Tuesday, January 21, 2014, shall be limited to those issues related to the '462, '054, and '464 patents. The parties shall submit their special voir dire, jury instructions, and verdict form on or before January 15, 2014. On or before January 15, 2014, IV shall file a copy of Dr. Stewart's expert report as it relates to the survey and both parties shall file no more than a ten-page memorandum of law explaining why, or why not, such evidence should be admitted. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 1/8/2014. (nmfn) (Entered: 01/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding response to plaintiffs' letter regarding patents at trial - re 286 Letter. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Brian E. Farnan regarding January 21, 2014 Trial. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting in part and denying in part 230 Motion for Summary Judgment ; granting in part and denying in part 252 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 1/2/2014. (nmfn) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 284 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 1/2/2014. (nmfn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 12/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Pretrial Order by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 12/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to EXTEND the deadline to submit proposed jury instructions, verdict forms and voir dire to 1/10/2014 - filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Notice Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 282 filed by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Second Supplemental Response To Plaintiffs' Interrogatory No. 3 by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 279 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, Resetting Scheduling Order Deadlines ( The Final Pretrial Conference is rescheduled for 1/2/2014 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 2A before Judge Sue L. Robinson.). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 11/15/2013. (nmfn) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Stephen J. Kraftschik regarding Response to Newly Proposed Constructions - re 277 Letter. (Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 11/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson from Brian E. Farnan regarding Proposed Alternative Constructions. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER adopting the August 29, 2013 oral order of Chief Magistrate Judge Thynge and overruling the objections (re: 259 Objections filed by Motorola Mobility LLC, 265 Response to Objections filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC ). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 10/25/2013. (nmfn) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY BRIEF re 252 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 10/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REDACTED VERSION of 241 Letter, by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-G)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REDACTED VERSION of 268 Appendix, by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REDACTED VERSION of 267 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REDACTED VERSION of 250 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of filing the following Non-Paper material(s) in multi media format: a disc containing a video identified as IVA1229 in Intellectual Ventures' Corrected Appendix (D.I. 268). Original Non-paper material(s) to be filed with the Clerk's Office. Notice filed by Brian E. Farnan on behalf of Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Withdrawal of Intellectual Ventures' Appendix of Exhibits by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC re 251 Appendix, (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          [SEALED] APPENDIX re 267 Answering Brief in Opposition, Corrected by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2 of 7, # 2 Part 3 of 7, # 3 Part 4 of 7, # 4 Part 5 of 7, # 5 Part 6 of 7, # 6 Part 7 of 7, # 7 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 252 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 10/18/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of Supplemental Response To Plaintiffs' Interrogatory No. 3 by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 09/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE TO OBJECTIONS by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC re 259 Objections . (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 09/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REDACTED VERSION of 262 Appendix by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 36 & 37)(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 09/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REDACTED VERSION of 261 Reply Brief by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 09/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      [SEALED] APPENDIX re 261 Reply Brief by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 36-37)(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 09/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re 230 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 09/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, Rescheduling Hearings( The Oral Argument is rescheduled for 10/25/2013 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 2A before Judge Sue L. Robinson.). Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 9/13/2013. (nmfn) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OBJECTIONS by Motorola Mobility LLC -- Objections to August 29, 2013 Order --. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-C)(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REDACTED VERSION of 249 Appendix by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 28 - 34 Part 1, # 2 Exhibit 34 Part 2 - 37)(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REDACTED VERSION of 248 Claim Construction Surreply Brief by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REDACTED VERSION of 254 Appendix, by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 8, # 2 Exhibit 9 - 26)(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REDACTED VERSION of 253 Opening Brief in Support by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      [SEALED] APPENDIX re 252 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, 253 Opening Brief in Support of Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-26 Part 1, # 2 Exhibits 1-26 Part 2, # 3 Exhibits 1-26 Part 3)(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 09/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re 252 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by Motorola Mobility LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 9/27/2013. (Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 09/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement - filed by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 09/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            THIS HAS BEEN WITHDRAWN, SEE D.I. NOS. 268 (CORRECTED APPENDIX OF EXHIBITS) AND D.I. NO. 269 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL [SEALED] APPENDIX re 250 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Part 1 of 6, # 2 Part 2 of 6, # 3 Part 3 of 6, # 4 Part 4 of 6, # 5 Part 5 of 6, # 6 Part 6 of 6, # 7 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) Modified on 10/9/2013 (nmfn, ). (Entered: 09/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 230 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 9/16/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 09/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                [SEALED] APPENDIX re 248 Claim Construction Surreply Brief by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 28-37 Part 1, # 2 Exhibits 28-37 Part 2)(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 09/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  [SEALED] CLAIM CONSTRUCTION SURREPLY BRIEF filed by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 09/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REDACTED VERSION of 240 Appendix by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 12 - 16, # 2 Exhibit 17)(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 09/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REDACTED VERSION of 239 Reply Brief by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 09/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REDACTED VERSION of 236 Declaration, of Marc Belloli by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 09/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REDACTED VERSION of 232 Appendix,, by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Part 1, # 2 Exhibit Part 2, # 3 Exhibit Part 3, # 4 Exhibit Part 4, # 5 Exhibit Part 5, # 6 Exhibit Part 6, # 7 Exhibit Part 7, # 8 Exhibit Part 8)(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 08/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REDACTED VERSION of 231 Opening Brief in Support by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 08/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding Plaintiffs' August 26, 2013 letter - re 238 Letter. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 08/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Brian E. Farnan regarding Response to Defendant's August 26, 2013 Letter - re 237 Letter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  [SEALED] APPENDIX re 239 Reply Brief in Support of its Daubert Motion by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 12-15, # 2 Exhibit 16, # 3 Exhibit 17)(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re 212 MOTION to Preclude -- Motorola Mobility LLC's Reply in Support of its Daubert Motion -- filed by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Brian E. Farnan regarding Discovery Dispute. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding August 29, 2013 discovery dispute conference. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          [SEALED] DECLARATION re 235 Claim Construction Reply Brief of Marc Belloli by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 39, # 2 Exhibit 40, # 3 Exhibit 41, # 4 Exhibit 42, # 5 Exhibit 43, # 6 Exhibit 44, # 7 Exhibit 45, # 8 Exhibit 46)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CLAIM CONSTRUCTION REPLY BRIEF filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 8/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REDACTED VERSION of 227 Declaration, by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 8/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REDACTED VERSION of 226 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  [SEALED] APPENDIX re 231 Opening Brief in Support, 230 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-35 Part 1, # 2 Exhibits 1-35 Part 2, # 3 Exhibits 1-35 Part 3, # 4 Exhibits 1-35 Part 4, # 5 Exhibits 1-35 Part 5, # 6 Exhibits 1-35 Part 6, # 7 Exhibits 1-35 Part 7, # 8 Exhibits 1-35 Part 8)(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Main Document 232 replaced on 8/23/2013) (nmfn, ). (Attachment 6 replaced on 8/23/2013) (nmfn, ). (Attachment 8 replaced on 8/23/2013) (nmfn, ). (Entered: 08/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re 230 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed by Motorola Mobility LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 9/6/2013. (Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 08/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity - filed by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 08/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REDACTED VERSION of 225 Appendix,,, by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 and 2 - Part 1, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Part 2, # 3 Exhibit 3 - 5, # 4 Exhibit 6 - 23, # 5 Exhibit 24 - 26 - Part 1, # 6 Exhibit 26 - Part 2, # 7 Exhibit 26 - Part 3 and 27)(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 08/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REDACTED VERSION of 224 Claim Construction Reply Brief by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 08/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            [SEALED] DECLARATION re 226 Answering Brief in Opposition, of Nickolas Bohl by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 212 MOTION to Preclude filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 8/26/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                [SEALED] APPENDIX re 224 Claim Construction Reply Brief by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1 through 27 (Part 1), # 2 Exhibits 1 through 27 (Part 2), # 3 Exhibits 1 through 27 (Part 3), # 4 Exhibits 1 through 27 (Part 4), # 5 Exhibits 1 through 27 (Part 5), # 6 Exhibits 1 through 27 (Part 6), # 7 Exhibits 1 through 27 (Part 7), # 8 Exhibits 1 through 27 (Part 8), # 9 Exhibits 1 through 27 (Part 9), # 10 Exhibits 1 through 27 (Part 10), # 11 Exhibits 1 through 27 (Part 11), # 12 Exhibits 1 through 27 (Part 12), # 13 Exhibits 1 through 27 (Part 13), # 14 Exhibits 1 through 27 (Part 14), # 15 Exhibits 1 through 27 (Part 15), # 16 Exhibits 1 through 27 (Part 16), # 17 Exhibits 1 through 27 (Part 17), # 18 Exhibits 1 through 27 (Part 18), # 19 Exhibits 1 through 27 (Part 19), # 20 Exhibits 1 through 27 (Part 20))(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 08/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  [SEALED] CLAIM CONSTRUCTION REPLY BRIEF filed by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 08/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Nickolas Bohl - filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION Amending Briefing Deadlines by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of filing the following document(s) in multi media format: the corrected Joint Appendix for Claim Construction Briefing. Original material(s) to be filed with the Clerk's Office. Notice filed by Brian E. Farnan on behalf of Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute - filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 8/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REDACTED VERSION of 214 Appendix, APPENDIX OF EXHIBITS TO DEFENDANT MOTOROLA MOBILITY LLC'S OPENING BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS DAUBERT MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFFS' EXPERTS by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-11)(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 08/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 8/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REDACTED VERSION of 213 Opening Brief in Support DEFENDANT MOTOROLA MOBILITY LLC'S OPENING BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS DAUBERT MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFFS' EXPERTS by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 08/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of Supplemental Expert Report of Gwenael Le Bodic Regarding Motorola Mobility's Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent Number 7,810,144 by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 08/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Setting Teleconference: a teleconference has been scheduled for Thursday, August 29, 2013 at 11:00 a.m. Eastern Time with Magistrate Judge Thynge to address discovery matters. Brian E. Farnan, Esquire shall initiate the teleconference call. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 8/6/13. (cak) (Entered: 08/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MULTI MEDIA DOCUMENT (JOINT APPENDIX FOR CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEFING) filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC in the form of a CD Rom. Filing related to 209 Notice of Filing Multi Media Materials. (Media on file in Clerk's Office). (fms) (Entered: 07/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      [SEALED] APPENDIX re 213 Opening Brief in Support by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-11 Part 1, # 2 Exhibits 1-11 Part 2, # 3 Exhibits 1-11 Part 3, # 4 Exhibits 1-11 Part 4, # 5 Exhibits 1-11 Part 5)(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 07/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re 212 MOTION to Preclude filed by Motorola Mobility LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/12/2013. (Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 07/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Preclude - filed by Motorola Mobility LLC. Kraftschik, Stephen) Modified on 7/30/2013 (nmfn). (Entered: 07/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION re 210 Claim Construction Opening Brief of Marc Belloli by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit 33, # 34 Exhibit 34, # 35 Exhibit 35, # 36 Exhibit 36, # 37 Exhibit 37, # 38 Exhibit 38)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 07/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CLAIM CONSTRUCTION OPENING BRIEF filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 07/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of filing the following document(s) in multi media format: Joint Appendix for Claim Construction Briefing. Original material(s) to be filed with the Clerk's Office. Notice filed by Brian E. Farnan on behalf of Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 07/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CLAIM Construction Chart by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 07/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Third Supplemental Response to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories (No. 1) by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION Increasing Page Limits For Claim Construction Briefs by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 7/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE to Take Deposition of Randy Katz on 7/17/2013 - Amended by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 07/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE to Take Deposition of Mark Seely on July 12, 2013 by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 07/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jerry D. Gibson, Ph.D. on July 3, 2013 by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE to Take Deposition of Darran Cairns on July 17, 2013 by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to EXTEND Certain Case Deadlines to Various Dates - filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE to Take Deposition of Hugh Smith on July 24, 2013 at 9:00 a.m. by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE to Take Deposition of Darran Cairns on July 10, 2013 at 9:00 a.m. by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Carl Sanders - filed by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jason Nieh, Ph.D. on June 28, 2013 by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE to Take Deposition of Donald Alpert, Ph.D. on June 26, 2013 by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE to Take Deposition of Brian Von Herzen on July 17, 2013 by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE to Take Deposition of Mark Seely on July 12, 2013 by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE to Take Deposition of Gwenael Le Bodic on July 2, 2013 by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE to Take Deposition of Randy Katz on July 10, 2013 by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE to Take Deposition of Timothy J. Drabik on June 28, 2013 by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE to Take Deposition of Martin Rinard on 6/21/2013 by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 06/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Rebuttal Expert Report of Dr. Martin Rinard Regarding Secondary Considerations Related to the Invalidity of U.S. Patent Number 7,810,144; (2) Rebuttal Expert Report of Dr. Timothy J. Drabik Regarding Secondary Considerations Related to the Question of Invalidity of U.S. Patent Nos. 6,412,953 and 7,120,462; (3) Rebuttal Expert Report of Dr. Randy Howard Katz Regarding Secondary Considerations for Claims of U.S. Patent No. 7,409,450; and (4) Expert Report of Dr. Brian Von Herzen Regarding Purported Secondary Considerations of Non-Obviousness for U.S. Patent Nos. 6,557,054 and 6,658,464 by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 06/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 6/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE to Take Deposition of David Stewart, Ph.D. on June 14, 2013 at 9:00 a.m. by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 06/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 6/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Rebuttal Expert Report of Timothy J. Drabik Regarding Infringement of U.S. Patent Number 7,120,462; (2) Expert Report of Gwenael Le Bodic Regarding Motorola Mobilitys Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent Number 7,810,144; (3) Rebuttal Expert Report of Dr. Timothy J. Drabik Regarding the Question of Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 6,412,953; (4) Rebuttal Expert Report of Mark Seely Regarding Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent No. 7,409,450; and (5) Expert Report of Dr. Brian Von Herzen Regarding the Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent Nos. 6,557,054 and 6,658,464 by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 06/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Fact Witness List by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 05/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 185 Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION Amending Scheduling Order re SO ORDERED, Scheduling Order,,,,,, 16 Proposed Order by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Motorola Mobility LLC. (Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 05/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 5/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Expert Report of Dr. Martin Rinard Regarding the Validity of U.S. Patent Number 7,810,144; (2) Expert Report of Dr. Timothy J. Drabik Regarding the Question of Validity of U.S. Patent Number 6,412,953; (3) Expert Report of Dr. Timothy J. Drabik regarding the Invalidity of U.S. Patent Number 7,120,462 (4) Expert Report of Dr. Randy Howard Katz Regarding the Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 7,409,450; and (5) Expert Report of Dr. Brian Von Herzen Regarding the Invalidity of U.S. Patent Nos. 6,557,054 and 6.658,464 by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 05/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Eighth Supplemental Invalidity Contentions by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      [SEALED] Official Transcript of telephone conference held on May 1, 2013 before Judge Thynge. Court Reporter/Transcriber Heather Triozzi,Telephone number (302) 658-6697. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/31/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/10/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/8/2013. (vjg) (Entered: 05/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 5/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SO ORDERED re 180 Stipulation and Order regarding Third Party Discovery obtained after the close of fact discovery. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 5/9/13. (cak) (Entered: 05/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION and Order regarding Third Party Discovery obtained after the close of Fact Discovery by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE to Take Deposition of Inchul Kang on May 9, 2013 by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 05/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE to Take Deposition of Brett Galloway on May 8, 2013 by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 05/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE to Take Deposition of Blagoja Bakrevski a/k/a Bill Baker on May 10, 2013 by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 05/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE to Take Deposition of Beshad Besaghi on May 10, 2013 by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 05/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 5/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REDACTED VERSION of 169 Letter, by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-B)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 5/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REDACTED VERSION of 165 Letter, by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-F)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 05/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REDACTED VERSION of 170 Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding response to IV's April 25, 2013 discovery dispute letter by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A through G)(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 05/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REDACTED VERSION of 163 Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding May 1, 2013 discovery conference by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1 through 4)(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 05/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORAL ORDER Setting Teleconference: Counsel for plaintiff to initiate the call. A continuation of the telephonic discovery dispute is set for 5/7/2013 at 01:30 PM EASTERN TIME before Judge Mary Pat Thynge. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 5/1/13. The transcript of the telephonic hearing of 5/1/13 shall serve at the order of the court in this matter.(cak) (Entered: 05/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding response to IV's April 25, 2013 discovery dispute letter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - G)(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 04/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Brian E. Farnan regarding Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's April 25, 2013 Letter - re 163 Letter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding response to IV's April 25, 2013 regarding subpoenas to third-party witnesses. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 04/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of Second Supplemental Response to Plaintiffs' Second Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 9 and 10) by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Brian E. Farnan regarding Discovery Dispute. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Brian E. Farnan regarding Discovery Dispute. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Certificate of Service)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Mary Pat Thynge from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding May 1, 2013 discovery conference. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 4)(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Intellectual Ventures I LLC's Third Supplemental Answers to Motorola Mobility LLC's First Set of Interrogatories; (ii) Intellectual Ventures II LLC's Third Supplemental Answers to Motorola Mobility LLC's First Set of Interrogatories; (iii) Intellectual Ventures I LLC's Second Supplemental Answers to Motorola Mobility, Inc.'s Third Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 11-15); (iv) Intellectual Ventures II LLC's Second Supplemental Answers to Motorola Mobility, Inc.'s Third Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 11-15); and (v) Plaintiffs' Sixth Supplemental Disclosure of Initial Claim Charts Pursuant to Paragraph 4(c) of Default Standard for Discovery, including Discovery of Electronically Stored Information (ESI) by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Seventh Supplemental Invalidity Contentions by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of Second Supplemental Response to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-8) by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SO ORDERED re 158 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to EXTEND certain case deadlines to various dates filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Intellectual Ventures I LLC. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 4/22/13. (cak) (Entered: 04/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to EXTEND certain case deadlines to various dates - filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of Supplemental Response To Plaintiffs' Fifth Set Of Interrogatories To Defendant (No. 13); and Defendant's Supplemental Responses To Plaintiffs' Third Set Of Interrogatories (No. 11) by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 04/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Subpoena of Blue Coat Systems Inc. by Motorola Mobility LLC (Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 04/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SO ORDERED re 154 Stipulation and Order for Supplemental Protective Order Governing Discovery from Non-Party Qualcomm in this Case. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 4/15/13. (cak) (Entered: 04/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROPOSED ORDER Protective Order Governing Discovery from Non-Party Qualcomm by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Intellectual Ventures I LLC and Intellectual Ventures II LLC's Responses to Motorola Mobility LLC's Third Request for Production of Documents (Nos. 1-5); (ii) Intellectual Ventures I LLC and Intellectual Ventures II LLC's Responses to Motorola Mobility LLC's First Set of Authentication Requests for Admission (Nos. 1-62); (iii) Intellectual Ventures I LLC's Responses to Motorola Mobility LLC's First Requests for Admission (Nos. 1-44); and (iv) Intellectual Ventures II LLC's Responses to Motorola Mobility LLC's First Requests for Admission (Nos. 1-50) by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Setting Teleconference: Brian E. Farnan, Esquire to initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 5/1/2013 at 11:00 AM before Judge Mary Pat Thynge to address discovery issues. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 4/10/13. (cak) (Entered: 04/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Sixth Supplemental Invalidity Contentions by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 04/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Subpoena (Blue Coat Systems Inc.) by Motorola Mobility LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE to Take Deposition of Alvin Von Ruff on 4/8/2013 by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE to Take Deposition of John Soward on 4/5/2013 by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE to Take Deposition of Robert Packer on 4/19/2013 by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE to Take Deposition of Inchul Kang on 4/10/2013 by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE to Take Deposition of Brett Galloway on 4/17/2013 by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE to Take Deposition of Beshad Besaghi on 4/12/2013 by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of Privilege Log for Intellectual Ventures I LLC and Intellectual Ventures II LLC by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of Fourth Amended Initial Disclosures of Motorola Mobility LLC by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Subpoena (directed to Dr. Isaac Nassi) by Motorola Mobility LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Subpoena (Dr. Isaac Nassi) by Motorola Mobility LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE to Take Deposition of Nathan Myhrvold (Amended) on March 26, 2013 by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 03/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of Response to Plaintiffs' Sixth Set of Interrogatories to Defendant (No. 14) by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 03/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Subpoena (Hari Balakrishnan) by Motorola Mobility LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 03/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of of Subpoena (Director Dipankar Raychaudhuri) by Motorola Mobility LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 03/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Subpoena to Interop Technologies by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Subpoena of Robert T. Short, Ph.D. by Motorola Mobility LLC (Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 03/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Subpoena to Walt Scacchi, Ph.D. by Motorola Mobility LLC (Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 03/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 3/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF SERVICE of Response to Plaintiffs' Fifth Set of Interrogatories to Defendant (No. 13) by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 03/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 3/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Change of Address by Brian E. Farnan (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 3/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Motorola Mobility LLCs Third Set of Requests For Production of Documents to Plaintiffs Intellectual Ventures I LLC and Intellectual Ventures II LLC, (2) Motorola Mobility LLCs First Set of Requests for Admission to Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC, (3) Motorola Mobility LLCs First Set of Requests for Admission to Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures I LLC, and (4) Motorola Mobility LLCs First Set of Authentication Requests for Admission to Plaintiffs Intellectual Ventures I LLC and Intellectual Ventures II LLC by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 03/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 3/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Sixth Set of Interrogatories to Defendant (No. 14) by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Michael) (Main Document 129 replaced on 3/12/2013) (fms). (Entered: 03/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Certain Case Deadlines and other Related Matters to Various Dates - filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Leonard J. Augustine, Jr. - filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE to Take Deposition of Christopher Clarke on March 14, 2013 by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 03/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Shayne E. O'Reilly - filed by Motorola Mobility LLC. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 03/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Subpoena (directed to Dr. Behshad Baseghi) by Motorola Mobility LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 03/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Response to Plaintiffs' Fourth Set of Interrogatories (No. 12) by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 02/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE to Take Deposition of Sandy Trevor on 3/8/2013 by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of Intellectual Ventures I LLC's Fifth Supplemental Answers to Motorola Mobility LLC's First Set of Interrogatories and Plaintiffs' Fifth Supplemental Disclosure of Initial Claim Charts Pursuant to Paragraph 4(C) of Default Standard for Discovery, Including Discovery of Electronically Stored Information ("ESI") by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Fifth Supplemental Invalidity Contentions by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 02/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jim Zhuang on February 28, 2013 by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 2/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Fourth Supplemental Disclosure of Initial Claim Charts Pursuant to Paragraph 4(c) of Default Standard for Discovery, Including Discovery of Electronically Stored Information ("ESI") by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 2/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of Intellectual Ventures I LLC's Fourth Supplemental Answers to Motorola Mobility LLC's First Set of Interrogatories by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jim Weisfield (First Amended) on February 21, 2013 by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 02/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE to Take Deposition of Maurice W. Haff on March 1, 2013 by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 02/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 2/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jason Tsuyemera on 2/22/2013 by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 2/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE to Take Deposition of Timothy Kowalski on 2/21/2013 by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 2/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE to Take Deposition of Tom Schirtzinger on 2/19/2013 by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Fifth Set of Interrogatories to Defendant (No. 13) by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE to Take Deposition of Mark Zhou on 3/11/2013 by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE to Take Deposition of Han Wei on 3/12/2013 by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE to Take Deposition of Daniel Hu on 3/14/2013 by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE to Take Deposition of Liang Bin on 3/13/2013 by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jim Barber on 2/14/2013 by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE to Take Deposition of Rajendra Kumar [SECOND AMENDED NOTICE] on February 12, 2013 at 9:00 a.m. by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 02/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE to Take Deposition of Peter Detkin [SECOND AMENDED NOTICE] on February 12, 2013 at 8:00 a.m. by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 02/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE to Take Deposition of Rajendra Kumar (First Amended) on February 12, 2013 by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 02/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE to Take Deposition of Peter Detkin (First Amended) on February 12, 2013 by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 02/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE to Take Deposition of Sandy Trevor on March 11, 2013 by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE to Take Deposition of Gary Grube on March 14, 2013 by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of Third Amended Initial Disclosures of Motorola Mobility LLC by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 02/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE to Take Deposition of Don Merino on February 7, 2013 by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 02/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE to Take Deposition of Kerry Smith, Sr. on February 6, 2013 by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 02/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 1/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE to Take Deposition of Dimitri Sokolov on February 18, 2013 by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Fourth Set of Interrogatories to Defendant (No. 12) by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Intellectual Ventures I LLC's Responses to Motorola Mobility LLC's Notice of 30(b)(6) Deposition and (ii) Intellectual Ventures II LLC's Responses to Motorola Mobility LLC's Notice of 30(b)(6) Deposition by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoenas by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C, # 2 Exhibit D-F, # 3 Exhibit G-J)(Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 01/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE to Take Deposition of Michelle Iiag on January 8, 2013 by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 01/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE to Take Deposition of Sen Yang on January 10, 2013 by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 01/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 12/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Fourth Supplemental Invalidity Contentions by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 12/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of Intellectual Ventures I LLC's Third Supplemental Answers to Motorola Mobility LLC's First Set of Interrogatories by Intellectual Ventures I LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 12/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 12/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's First Supplemental Response To Plaintiffs' Second Set Of Interrogatories To Defendant (Nos. 9 And 10) by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 12/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 12/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Responses To Plaintiffs' Third Set Of Interrogatories (No. 11) by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 12/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE to Take Deposition of Intellectual Ventures II, LLC on a date, time and location to by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 12/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE to Take Deposition of Intellectual Ventures I LLC on a date, time and location by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 12/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Second Supplemental Response to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant (No. 1) by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 12/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE to Take Deposition of RICHARD REISMAN on December 20, 2012 at 9:30 a.m. by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 12/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of Motorola Mobility's Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' Notice of Deposition by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 12/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Fourth Supplemental Invalidity Charts by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 12/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jim Weisfield on a date and time to be agreed by counsel by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 11/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE to Take Deposition of Kerry Smith, Sr. on a date and time to be agreed by counsel by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 11/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE to Take Deposition of Peter Detkin on a date and time to be agreed by counsel by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 11/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE to Take Deposition of Richard Harris on a date and time to be agreed by counsel by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 11/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE to Take Deposition of Mario Obeidat on a date and time to be agreed by counsel by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 11/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE to Take Deposition of Nathan Myhrvold on a date and time to be agreed by counsel by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 11/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE to Take Deposition of Maurice W. Haff on a date and time to be agreed by counsel by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 11/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE to Take Deposition of Don Merino on a date and time to be agreed by counsel by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 11/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Extend the Deadline for Exchange of Claim Terms and Proposed Constructions to 1/10/2013; 1/25/2013 - filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Setting Mediation Conferences: A Mediation Conference is set for 4/16/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2B before Judge Mary Pat Thynge. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 11/21/2012. (cak) (Entered: 11/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Plaintiffs' Second Supplemental Disclosure of Initial Claim Charts Pursuant to Paragraph 4(c) of Default Standard for Discovery, including Discovery of Electronically Stored Information ("ESI"), (ii) Intellectual Ventures I LLC's Second Supplemental Answers to Motorola Mobility LLC's First Set of Interrogatories, (iii) Intellectual Ventures II LLC's Second Supplemental Answers to Motorola Mobility LLC's First Set of Interrogatories, (iv) Intellectual Ventures I LLC's First Supplemental Answers to Motorola Mobility LLC's Third Set of Interrogatories, and (v) Intellectual Ventures II LLC's First Supplemental Answers to Motorola Mobility LLC's Third Set of Interrogatories by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 11/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of Supplemental Response to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant (Nos. 1-8) by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 11/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 68 Filed: 11/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION to Amend Scheduling Order by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Third Set of Interrogatories to Defendant (No. 11) by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jim Zhuang on 12/19/2012 by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE to Take Deposition of Sen Yang on 12/20/2012 by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE to Take Deposition of David Whaley on 12/7/2012 by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jason Tsuyemera on 12/11/2012 by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE to Take Deposition of Balaji Thiagarajan on 12/10/2012 by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE to Take Deposition of Tom Schirtzinger on 1/7/2013 by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 11/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE to Take Deposition of Chris Rypinsky on 12/14/2012 by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 11/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE to Take Deposition of Joe Nowack on 12/17/2012 by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE to Take Deposition of Timothy Kowalski on 1/8/2013 by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE to Take Deposition of Michelle Iiag on 12/6/2012 by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE to Take Deposition of Schin Holla on 12/13/2012 by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jerry Hanley on 12/12/2012 by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE to Take Deposition of Peter Craun on 12/5/2012 by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jim Barber on 12/18/2012 by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE to Take Deposition of Nareen Aerrabotu on 12/21/2012 by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE to Take Deposition of Motorola Mobility, LLC by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Third Supplemental Invalidity Contentions by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 11/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Intellectual Ventures I LLC's Answers to Motorola Mobility, Inc.'s Third Set of Interrogatories; and (ii) Intellectual Ventures II LLC's Answers to Motorola Mobility, Inc.'s Third Set of Interrogatories by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Second Supplemental Invalidity Contentions by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 10/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Peter Mikhail - filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James Hall - filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Subpoenas by Motorola Mobility LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-9, # 2 Exhibits 10-12)(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 10/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Subpoena by Motorola Mobility LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Kraftschik, Stephen) (Entered: 10/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Plaintiffs' First Supplemental Disclosure of Initial Claim Charts Pursuant to Paragraph 4(c) of Default Standard for Discovery, including Discovery of Electronically Stored Information ("ESI"); (ii) Intellectual Ventures I LLC's First Supplemental Answers to Motorola Mobility LLC's First Set of Interrogatories; (iii) Intellectual Ventures I LLC's First Supplemental Answers to Motorola Mobility LLC's Second Set of Interrogatories; (iv) Intellectual Ventures II LLC's First Supplemental Answers to Motorola Mobility LLC's First Set of Interrogatories; and (v) Intellectual Ventures II LLC's First Supplemental Answers to Motorola Mobility LLC's Second Set of Interrogatories by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Michael) (Entered: 10/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Response to Second Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things; (ii) Second Amended Initial Disclosures of Motorola Mobility LLC; (iii) Motorola Mobility LLC's Third Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures I LLC and (iv) Motorola Mobility LLC's Third Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 10/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's First Supplemental Invalidity Contentions by Motorola Mobility LLC.(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 09/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Setting Teleconference: a teleconference has been scheduled for Thursday, November 15, 2012 at 11:00 a.m. Eastern time with Magistrate Judge Thynge to discuss the status of the case and the parties negotiations in relation to mediation. Plaintiffs counsel shall initiate the teleconference call. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 9/11/2012. (cak) (Entered: 09/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Second Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 08/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Substitute Party: Motorola Mobility LLC to replace Motorola Mobility, Inc. (UNOPPOSED) - filed by Motorola Mobility Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 08/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Amended Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Motorola Mobility Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Google Inc. for Motorola Mobility Inc... (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 08/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Intellectual Ventures I LLC's Answers to Motorola Mobility, Inc.'s Second Set of Interrogatories; (ii) Intellectual Ventures II LLC's Answers to Motorola Mobility, Inc.'s Second Set of Interrogatories; and (iii) Intellectual Ventures I LLC and Intellectual Ventures II LLC's Responses to Motorola Mobility, Inc.'s Second Request for Production of Documents by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 07/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION regarding E-Discovery by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 07/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROPOSED ORDER Protective Order by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Main Document 34 replaced on 7/18/2012) (fms). (Entered: 07/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Jon R. Pierce as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer with Kilpatrick Townsend. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 06/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Motorola Mobility, Inc.'s Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiffs Intellectual Ventures I LLC and Intellectual Ventures II LLC; (2) Motorola Mobility, Inc.'s Second Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures I LLC; and (3) Motorola Mobility, Inc.'s Second Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC by Motorola Mobility Inc..(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 06/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney D. Clay Holloway - filed by Motorola Mobility Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 06/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Invalidity Contentions by Motorola Mobility Inc..(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 05/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Amended Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Motorola Mobility Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Google Inc., Corporate Parent Motorola Mobility Holdings, Inc. for Motorola Mobility Inc... (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 05/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Intellectual Ventures I LLC's Responses to Motorola Mobility, Inc.'s First Request for Production of Documents, (ii) Intellectual Ventures II LLC's Responses to Motorola Mobility, Inc.'s First Request for Production of Documents, (iii) Intellectual Ventures I LLC's Answers to Motorola Mobility, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories, and (iv) Intellectual Ventures II LLC's Answers to Motorola Mobility, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 03/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Responses to Plaintiffs' Second Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 9-10) by Motorola Mobility Inc..(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 03/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Response to First Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things; and 2) Response to Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant (Nos. 1-8) by Motorola Mobility Inc..(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 03/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of Amended Initial Disclosures of Motorola Mobility, Inc. by Motorola Mobility Inc..(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 03/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Second Set of Interrogatories to Defendant (Nos. 9-10) by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures of Motorola Mobility, Inc. by Motorola Mobility Inc..(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 02/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosures by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Setting Teleconference (Defense counsel to initiate the call): A Telephone Conference is set for 9/5/2012 at 11:00 AM before Judge Mary Pat Thynge. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 2/2/2012. (cak) (Entered: 02/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Candice C. Decaire - filed by Motorola Mobility Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 01/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures I LLC; 2) First Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures I LLC; 3) First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC; and 4) First Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC by Motorola Mobility Inc..(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 01/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Setting Teleconference (Plaintiffs' counsel to initiate the call): A Telephone Conference is set for 2/2/2012 at 11:00 AM before Judge Mary Pat Thynge to discuss ADR. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 1/17/2012. (cak) (Entered: 01/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Judge Thynge's procedures for discovery disputes. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 1/17/12. (cak) (Entered: 01/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling Order by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson Enclosing Proposed Scheduling Order)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling Order by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Letter to The Honorable Sue L. Robinson Enclosing Proposed Scheduling Order)(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT (NOS. 1-8), and (ii) FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THINGS by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to 10 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 01/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order Setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 1/13/2012 at 09:00 AM before Judge Sue L. Robinson. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 12/22/2011. (nmf) (Entered: 12/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Motorola Mobility Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 12/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC by Motorola Mobility Inc..(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 12/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William H. Boice, Steven D. Moore, Jon R. Pierce and Alton L. Absher, III - filed by Motorola Mobility Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 12/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REDACTED VERSION of 7 Disclosure Statement by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 7 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to December 13, 2011 - filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Motorola Mobility Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Margaret Elizabeth Day, Ian N. Feinberg, David L. Alberti, Clayton Thompson, Sal Lim, Yakov Zolotorev, and Marc Belloli of Feinberg Day Alberti & Thompson LLP - filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. Motorola Mobility Inc. served on 10/6/2011, answer due 10/27/2011. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 10/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,810,144; 6,412,953; 7,409,450; 7,120,462; 6,557,054; 6,658,464. (ksr, ) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (ksr, ) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Motorola Mobility Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0311-955034.) - filed by Intellectual Ventures I LLC, Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet)(ksr, ) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 491 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?