SonicWALL Inc. v. Innovatio IP Ventures LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:11-cv-00920
District Judge Leonard P. Stark, presiding

Tags
Last Updated December 25, 2016 at 7:50 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo SONIC WALL, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher F. Jeu

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Allen Jacobs +1 415 268 7000 +1 415 268 7522 mjacobs@mofo.com

Represented by Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP

v.
No Logo Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Laurence Dorsney +1 302 984 6087 kdorsney@potteranderson.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2201
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT that case transferred from Delaware has been opened in Northern District of Illinois as case 1:12-cv-00426. (dab) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    TRANSFER ORDER (certified copy) in MDL No. 2303 - In Re: Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC Patent Litigation transferred to the Northern District of Illinois. (ntl) (Entered: 01/26/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/10/2012, Entered: None
      Second STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to REPLY to SonicWall, Inc.'s Answering Brief regarding Motion to Dismiss (DI 11) to January 17, 2012 - filed by Innovatio IP Ventures LLC, SonicWALL Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 01/10/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/30/2011, Entered: None
        STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to File Reply Brief regarding D.I. 11 - Motion to Dismiss or Transfer to January 10, 2012 - filed by Innovatio IP Ventures LLC, SonicWALL Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 12/30/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/22/2011, Entered: None
          DECLARATION re 11 Answering Brief in Opposition - Declaration of Christopher Jeu by SonicWALL Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 15, # 2 Exhibit 16 - 20, # 3 Exhibit 21, # 4 Exhibit 22 - 24)(Norman, Elena) (Entered: 12/22/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/22/2011, Entered: None
            ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 9 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Illinois filed by SonicWALL Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 1/3/2012. (Norman, Elena) (Entered: 12/22/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 10 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None
              OPENING BRIEF in Support re 9 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Illinois filed by Innovatio IP Ventures LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 12/22/2011. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Illinois - filed by Innovatio IP Ventures LLC. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: None
                  MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael A. Jacobs and Attorney Christopher F. Jeu - filed by SonicWALL Inc.. (Squire, Monte) (Entered: 11/02/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/26/2011, Entered: None
                    STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint to December 5, 2011 - filed by Innovatio IP Ventures LLC, SonicWALL Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/17/2011, Entered: None
                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by SonicWALL Inc.. Innovatio IP Ventures LLC served on 10/13/2011, answer due 11/3/2011. (Norman, Elena) (Entered: 10/17/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None
                        Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by SonicWALL Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Thoma Bravo Fund IX LP for SonicWALL Inc.. (els) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None
                          Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,665,536 B1; 6,697,415; 7,013,138 B2; 7,710,907 B2; 7,916,747 B2; 7,873,343 B2; 7,546,167 B2. (els) Modified on 10/17/2011 (els). (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None
                            Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,714,559; 7,386,002; 7,535,921 B2; 7,548,553 B2; 5,740,366; 5,940,771; 6,374,311 B1, 7,457,646 B2; 5,546,397; 5,844,893. (els) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                              Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (els) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None
                                COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT filed with Jury Demand against Innovatio IP Ventures LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0311-956467.) - filed by SonicWALL Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-10, # 2 Exhibit 11-17, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(els) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 205 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?