Hurricane Shooters, LLC v. EMI Yoshi
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Middle District Court, Case No. 8:10-cv-00762-JSM-AEP

Tags
Last Updated July 26, 2017 at 2:42 AM EDT (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Hurricane Shooters, LLC, Plaintiff
No Logo Emi Yoshi Inc., Counter-Claimant
v.
No Logo Emi Yoshi Inc., Defendant
No Logo Hurricane Shooters, LLC, Counter-Defendant
No Logo Jay M. Cohen, Mediator

Toggle Switch Represented by Jay M. Cohen, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/28/2011 Jay M. Cohen +1 407 644 1181 +1 407 644 0012 jmcohen@jmcohenpa.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1338
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (162) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: None
CLERK'S certificate of destruction of exhibits and/or exhibit substitutes as to EMI Yoshi, Inc., Hurricane Shooters, LLC (RVB) (Entered: 06/20/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None
    PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT EXHIBITS: The records in this case indicate that this case was disposed of more than thirty (30) days ago. The records also indicate that the Clerk's Office is in possession of various exhibits used during the proceedings. Pursuant to Local Rule 5.04, you are notified that you have thirty (30) days for the removal of the exhibits from the custody of the Clerk's Office, or the exhibits will be destroyed, as permitted by Local Rule 5.04. (RVB) (Entered: 05/10/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER: The Joint Motion to Dissolve the Permanent Injunction 157 is GRANTED. The Permanent Injunction 144 is dissolved. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 12/12/2011. (LN) (Entered: 12/12/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 12/8/2011, Entered: None
        Joint MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically For Dissolution of Permanent Injunction by Hurricane Shooters, LLC. (Jakes, Frank) (Entered: 12/08/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 12/8/2011, Entered: None
          SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT entered In favor of Hurricane Shooters, LLC Against EMI Yoshi, Inc. by Hurricane Shooters, LLC. (Jakes, Frank) (Entered: 12/08/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 155 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None
            JUDGMENT in favor of Hurricane Shooters, LLC against EMI Yoshi, Inc. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 11/18/2011. (SMB) (Entered: 11/22/2011)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None
              NOTICE OF CANCELLATION: The Motion hearing scheduled for 11/30/2011 at 9:15 a.m. is cancelled. (LN) (Entered: 11/21/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                ENDORSED ORDER terminating 149 Motion for Contempt. (Withdrawn by counsel.) Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 11/21/2011. (LN) (Entered: 11/21/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of withdrawal of motion by Hurricane Shooters, LLC re 149 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Contempt filed by Hurricane Shooters, LLC (Weissman, Joseph) (Entered: 11/21/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                    NOTICE OF HEARING on 149 Plaintiff's Motion for Contempt: Motion Hearing set for WEDNESDAY, 11/30/2011 at 9:15 AM in Tampa Courtroom 13A before Judge James S. Moody Jr. Time reserved: 15 minutes. (LN) (Entered: 11/21/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None
                      DECLARATION of Joseph J. Weissman re 149 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Contempt by Hurricane Shooters, LLC. (Weissman, Joseph) (Entered: 11/21/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None
                        MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Contempt by Hurricane Shooters, LLC. (Weissman, Joseph) (Entered: 11/21/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None
                          Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: # 1 order) (BSN) (Entered: 11/21/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
                            NOTICE of exhibits placed in the exhibit room (jury trial - 2 folders)(JLH) (Entered: 11/21/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
                              DEFENDANT'S FINALIZED TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST. (SMB) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
                                PLAINTIFF'S FINALIZED TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST. (SMB) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  PERMANENT INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 11/18/2011. (Effective date: 11/21/11)(SMB) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None
                                    JURY VERDICT. (SMB) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge James S. Moody, Jr.: JURY TRIAL (DAY 5) completed on 11/18/2011. Verdict reached. The jury is excused. Court Reporter: Sherrill L. Jackson (SMB) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge James S. Moody, Jr: JURY TRIAL (DAY 4) held on 11/17/2011. Deliberations will resume on 11/18/11 at 9:00 a.m. Court Reporter: Sherrill L. Jackson (SMB) (Entered: 11/17/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: None
                                          PROPOSED verdict form filed byEMI Yoshi, Inc., Hurricane Shooters, LLC. (Weissman, Joseph) (Entered: 11/17/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: None
                                            PROPOSED verdict form filed byEMI Yoshi, Inc., Hurricane Shooters, LLC. (Weissman, Joseph) (Entered: 11/17/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: None
                                              PROPOSED jury instructions by EMI Yoshi, Inc., Hurricane Shooters, LLC. (Weissman, Joseph) (Entered: 11/17/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge James S. Moody, Jr.: JURY TRIAL (DAY 3) held on 11/16/2011. Trial will resume on 11/17/11 at 9:15 a.m. Court Reporter: Sherrill L. Jackson (SMB) (Entered: 11/16/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge James S. Moody, Jr.: JURY TRIAL (DAY 2) held on 11/15/2011. Trial will resume on 11/16/11 at 9:15 a.m. Court Reporter: Sherrill L. Jackson (SMB) (Entered: 11/15/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORAL ORDER as stated on the record 108 Motion in limine; 109 Motion in limine; 110 Motion in limine; and 111 Motion in limine. Issued by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 11/14/2011. (SMB) (Entered: 11/15/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER granting 132 Motion for electronics. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 11/15/2011. (LN) (Entered: 11/15/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge James S. Moody, Jr.: JURY TRIAL (DAY 1) held on 11/14/2011. Trial will resume on 11/15/11 at 9:15 a.m. Court Reporter: Sherrill L. Jackson (SMB) (Entered: 11/14/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                          MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for permission to use electronic devices for use at trial by EMI Yoshi, Inc.. (Kodsi, Neil) (Entered: 11/14/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ORDER granting 130 Motion to allow electronic equipment. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 11/14/2011. (LN) (Entered: 11/14/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                              Amended MOTION to allow electronic equipment, specifically laptops and cell phones by All Parties. (Weissman, Joseph) (Entered: 11/14/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 11/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                MEMORANDUM in opposition re 109 Motion in limine to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Damage Expert, Dr. Philip K. Porter, filed by Hurricane Shooters, LLC. (Weissman, Joseph) (Entered: 11/13/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 11/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                  RESPONSE in opposition re 108 MOTION in limine regarding Barring Testimony That The Patent Drawings Support The Volumetric Limitations of the Claims filed by Hurricane Shooters, LLC. (Weissman, Joseph) (Entered: 11/13/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 11/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                    PROPOSED verdict form filed byHurricane Shooters, LLC. (Weissman, Joseph) (Entered: 11/13/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 11/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                      PROPOSED jury instructions by Hurricane Shooters, LLC. (Weissman, Joseph) (Entered: 11/13/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 11/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                        PROPOSED jury instructions by EMI Yoshi, Inc.. (Kodsi, Neil) (Entered: 11/13/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 11/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                          EXHIBIT LIST by Hurricane Shooters, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Amended Trial Exhibit List)(Jakes, Frank) (Entered: 11/13/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 11/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                            WITNESS LIST by Hurricane Shooters, LLC. (Jakes, Frank) (Entered: 11/13/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 11/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                              PROPOSED verdict form filed byEMI Yoshi, Inc.. (Kodsi, Neil) (Entered: 11/13/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 11/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                PROPOSED voir dire questions by EMI Yoshi, Inc.. (Kodsi, Neil) (Entered: 11/13/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 11/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                  PROPOSED voir dire questions by Hurricane Shooters, LLC. (Jakes, Frank) (Entered: 11/11/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    ORDER granting 118 Motion to permit electronics. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 11/9/2011. (LN) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                      Joint MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically For Permission To Bring Laptop Computers Inside The Courthouse for Use During Trial by All Parties. (Weissman, Joseph) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in opposition re 111 Motion in limine to Prohibit Use of Deposition Testimony of Mark Douma filed by EMI Yoshi, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Kodsi, Neil) (Entered: 11/08/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in opposition re 110 Motion in limine to Exclude Defendant's Exhibit 17 filed by EMI Yoshi, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Kodsi, Neil) (Entered: 11/08/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice for lack of specificity 114 Motion to permit electronics. (Motion should cite make and model numbers of requested equipment.) Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 11/8/2011. (LN) (Entered: 11/08/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                              Joint MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Permission to Bring Laptop Computers Inside Courthouse for Use During Trial by All Parties. (Weissman, Joseph) (Entered: 11/08/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by David Wade Barman on behalf of EMI Yoshi, Inc. (Barman, David) (Entered: 11/08/2011)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  TRIAL NOTICE: JURY SELECTION and TRIAL is set for MONDAY, NOVEMBER 14, 2011, at 8:45 AM in Tampa Courtroom 13A before Judge James S. Moody Jr. **Trial is anticipated to take 3 - 4 days.** (SMB) (Entered: 11/02/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                    MOTION in limine regarding to Prohibit Introduction of Deposition Testimony of Mark Douma by Hurricane Shooters, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Weissman, Joseph) (Entered: 10/24/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                      MOTION in limine regarding to Exclude Defendant's Proposed Exhibit 17 and All References Thereto by Hurricane Shooters, LLC. (Weissman, Joseph) (Entered: 10/24/2011)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                        MOTION in limine Pursuant to Federal Rule of Evidence 702, to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiff's Damages Expert, Philip K. Porter by EMI Yoshi, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Kodsi, Neil) (Entered: 10/24/2011)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                          MOTION in limine regarding Barring Testimony That The Patent Drawings Support The Volumetric Limitations of the Claims by EMI Yoshi, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Kodsi, Neil) (Entered: 10/24/2011)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 10/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOVEMBER TRIAL CALENDAR: This case is set on the November trial term beginning on October 31, 2011 and running through December 2, 2011. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 10/20/2011. (SMB) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge James S. Moody, Jr.: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 10/6/2011. Court Reporter: Sherrill L. Jackson (SMB) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                PRETRIAL STATEMENT by EMI Yoshi, Inc., Hurricane Shooters, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit List, # 2 Exhibit Defendant's Exhibit List, # 3 Exhibit Deposition Designation)(Jakes, Frank) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of compliance With 35 U.S.C. § 282 by EMI Yoshi, Inc. (Kodsi, Neil) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    ENDORSED ORDER granting 102 Motion for extension of time to file Joint Pretrial Statement. Extension granted through 10-3-11. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 9/28/2011. (LN) (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Consent MOTION for extension of time to file document - Joint Pretrial Statement by Hurricane Shooters, LLC. (Weissman, Joseph) (Entered: 09/28/2011)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING: The Pre-Trial Conference hearing previously scheduled for 10/6/2011 at 9:30 a.m. is rescheduled. New scheduling date and time: THURSDAY, 10/6/2011 at 9:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 13A before Judge James S. Moody Jr. Time reserved: 15 minutes. *** Hearing changed as to TIME only; hearing date remains the same. *** (LN) (Entered: 09/27/2011)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 100 Filed: 9/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER denying 87 Plaintiff's Amended Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 9/8/2011. (LN) (Entered: 09/08/2011)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 9/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            REPLY to response to motion re 87 Amended MOTION for summary judgment (partial) CORRECTED filed by Hurricane Shooters, LLC. (Weissman, Joseph) (Entered: 09/01/2011)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 9/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              ENDORSED ORDER granting 97 Plaintiff's Motion for leave to file corrected reply brief. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 9/1/2011. (LN) (Entered: 09/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Consent MOTION for leave to file Corrected Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Hurricane Shooters, LLC. (Weissman, Joseph) (Entered: 08/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF re 91 Response in opposition to motion, 87 Amended MOTION for summary judgment (partial) Reply Brief filed by Hurricane Shooters, LLC. (Weissman, Joseph) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Hurricane Shooters, LLC re 83 Notice (Other) of Re-Filing Adam Sharp's Partial Deposition Transcript (Weissman, Joseph) Modified on 8/30/2011 (BSN). (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED ORDER granting 93 Motion for leave to file Reply. Reply must be filed by August 29, 2011. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 8/22/2011. (LN) (Entered: 08/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 8/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Consent MOTION for leave to file Reply Brief As To Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Hurricane Shooters, LLC. (Jakes, Frank) (Entered: 08/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by EMI Yoshi, Inc. re 91 Response in opposition to motion for partial Summary Judgment of Filing Deposition Excerpts (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Douma Deposition Excerpts, # 2 Appendix EMI Yoshi Deposition Excerpts, # 3 Appendix Hurricane Shooters Deposition Excerpts, # 4 Appendix lambert 2009 Deposition Excerpts, # 5 Appendix Lambert 2011 Deposition Excerpts, # 6 Appendix Mansfield Deposition Excerpts, # 7 Appendix Skala Deposition Excerpts)(Kodsi, Neil) (Entered: 08/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in opposition re 87 Amended MOTION for summary judgment (partial) filed by EMI Yoshi, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit N)(Kodsi, Neil) (Entered: 08/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              ENDORSED ORDER granting 89 Consented motion for extension of time to 8/8/11 to respond to Plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 7/26/2011. (SMB) (Entered: 07/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                Consent MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to 87 Amended MOTION for summary judgment (partial) by EMI Yoshi, Inc.. (Kodsi, Neil) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. (Entered: 07/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED ORDER terminating as moot 82 Motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 7/19/2011. (LN) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Amended MOTION for summary judgment (partial) by Hurricane Shooters, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Weissman, Joseph) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED ORDER granting 85 Motion for leave to file corrected Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 7/19/2011. (LN) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Consent MOTION for leave to file Corrected Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Hurricane Shooters, LLC. (Jakes, Frank) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Bryan Mansfield re 82 MOTION for summary judgment (partial) by Hurricane Shooters, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D, # 2 Exhibit E-F)(Weissman, Joseph) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Hurricane Shooters, LLC re 82 MOTION for summary judgment (partial) of Filing Deposition Excerpts (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Lambert, # 2 Appendix EMI Yoshi, # 3 Appendix Skala, # 4 Appendix Skala, # 5 Appendix Sharp)(Weissman, Joseph) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for summary judgment (partial) by Hurricane Shooters, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Weissman, Joseph) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                MEDIATION REPORT Hearing held on June 1, 2011 Hearing outcome: IMPASSE(Cohen, Jay) (Entered: 06/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 74 Motion for protective order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 5/31/2011. (MH) (MH). (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying 68 Motion to compel; denying as moot 69 Motion to compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 5/31/2011. (MH) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 5/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to response to motion re 69 Second MOTION to compel Production of Documents, 68 MOTION to compel Production of Documents filed by EMI Yoshi, Inc.. (Kodsi, Neil) (Entered: 05/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ENDORSED ORDER granting 76 Motion for leave to file. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 5/13/2011. (MH) (Entered: 05/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for leave to file Reply Memorandum in Support of Motions to Compel Production of Documents by EMI Yoshi, Inc.. (Kodsi, Neil) (Entered: 05/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 74 Joint MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Entry of Stipulated Confidentiality Agreement andJoint MOTION for protective order, 69 Second MOTION to compel Production of Documents, 68 MOTION to compel Production of Documents : Motion Hearing set for 5/31/2011 at 02:00 PM in Tampa Courtroom 10 A before Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. (MH) (Entered: 05/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Entry of Stipulated Confidentiality Agreement and, Joint MOTION for protective order by All Parties. (Jakes, Frank) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. (Entered: 05/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in opposition re 69 Second MOTION to compel Production of Documents filed by Hurricane Shooters, LLC. (Weissman, Joseph) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in opposition re 68 MOTION to compel Production of Documents filed by Hurricane Shooters, LLC. (Weissman, Joseph) (Entered: 04/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 4/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED ORDER granting 70 Plaintiff's Motion for extension of time to file response to 68 Motion to Compel. Response due by 4/28/2011. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 4/27/2011. (LN) (Entered: 04/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      Consent MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to 68 MOTION to compel Production of Documents by Hurricane Shooters, LLC. (Weissman, Joseph) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. (Entered: 04/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 4/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        Second MOTION to compel Production of Documents by EMI Yoshi, Inc.. (Kodsi, Neil) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. (Entered: 04/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 4/7/2011, Entered: None Motion to CompelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to compel Production of Documents by EMI Yoshi, Inc.. (Kodsi, Neil) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. (Entered: 04/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED ORDER granting 66 Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. NEW DEADLINES: Fact and expert discovery, 6-30-11; all initial expert disclosures, 5-10-11; all rebuttal expert disclosures, 5-31-11. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 4/6/2011. (LN) (Entered: 04/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 4/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION to modify Scheduling Order by Hurricane Shooters, LLC. (Weissman, Joseph) (Entered: 04/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 64 Defendant's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant's Amended Counterclaims, without prejudice. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 3/28/2011. (LN) (Entered: 03/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant's Amended Counterclaims by EMI Yoshi, Inc. (Kodsi, Neil) (Entered: 03/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED ORDER granting 62 Defendant Emi Yoshi, Inc's Unopposed Motion for Substitution of Counsel and Withdrawal of Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 3/15/2011. (LAK) (Entered: 03/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION to substitute attorney Neil D. Kodsi for Robert M. Schwartz, Unopposed MOTION for Robert M. Schwartz to withdraw as attorney for Defendant, EMI Yoshi, Inc. by EMI Yoshi, Inc.. (Kodsi, Neil) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. (Entered: 03/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED ORDER appointing Jay M. Cohen as mediator in this action. MEDIATION Conference set for JUNE 1, 2011. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 3/10/2011. (LN) (Entered: 03/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Hurricane Shooters, LLC of Mediation (Amended) (Jakes, Frank) (Entered: 03/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Neil D. Kodsi on behalf of EMI Yoshi, Inc. (Kodsi, Neil) (Entered: 03/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER appointing Jay M. Cohen as mediator in this action. Mediation Conference set for JUNE 2, 2011. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 2/22/2011. (LN) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Hurricane Shooters, LLC re 56 Order referring case to mediation of Setting Mediation (Jakes, Frank) (Entered: 02/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER REFERRING CASE to mediation and directing selection of a mediator on or before February 18, 2011. Lead counsel Frank R. Jakes to coordinate dates. Mediation shall be conducted on or before August 15, 2011. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 1/20/2011. (LN) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: Defendant EMI Yoshi's Motion for Reconsideration of Denial of Its Motion for Summary Judgment 53 is DENIED. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 1/11/2011. (LN) (Entered: 01/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in opposition re 53 MOTION for reconsideration of denial of its Motion for Summary Judgment on the basis of Intervening Case Law filed by Hurricane Shooters, LLC. (Weissman, Joseph) (Entered: 01/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for reconsideration of denial of its Motion for Summary Judgment on the basis of Intervening Case Law by EMI Yoshi. (Ames, Walter) (Entered: 12/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Counts II & III of Defendant's First Amended Counterclaim and to Strike Defendant's Third Affirmative Defense 40 is DENIED. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 12/2/2010. (LN) (Entered: 12/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment of Patent Invalidity 15 is DENIED. Defendant's Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 49 is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 11/19/2010. (LN) (Entered: 11/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in opposition re 49 Motion for miscellaneous relief filed by Hurricane Shooters, LLC. (Weissman, Joseph) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Resolution of its pending Dispositive Motion for Summary Judgment on the three briefs already filed by EMI Yoshi. (Ames, Walter) (Entered: 10/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of compliance re 45 Order to comply with electronic filing by EMI Yoshi (Ames, Walter) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE re 43 Notice of supplemental authority filed by EMI Yoshi. (Schwartz, Robert) (Entered: 09/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Remark: NO FURTHER PLEADINGS TO BE MAILED TO COUNSEL WALTER AMES PURSUANT TO 45 ORDER. (BSN) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER for WALTER D. AMES to comply with the administrative procedures regarding electronic filing. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 9/10/2010. (LN) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ENDORSED ORDER granting 42 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply Brief. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 9/9/2010. (LN) (Entered: 09/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of supplemental authority re 40 MOTION to dismiss Counterclaim Counts II & III and Third Affirmative Defense by Hurricane Shooters, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Princo Corp. v. Int'l Trade Comm'n)(Weissman, Joseph) (Entered: 09/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for leave to file Sur-Reply Brief in Opposition to Defendant's re 15 Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity by Hurricane Shooters, LLC. (Jakes, Frank) Modified on 9/9/2010 (BSN). (Entered: 09/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in opposition re 40 MOTION to dismiss Counterclaim Counts II & III and Third Affirmative Defense filed by EMI Yoshi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Schwartz, Robert) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to dismiss Counterclaim Counts II & III and Third Affirmative Defense by Hurricane Shooters, LLC. (Weissman, Joseph) (Entered: 08/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to 34 Counterclaim by Hurricane Shooters, LLC. Related document: 34 Amended answer to complaintCounterclaim filed by EMI Yoshi.(Weissman, Joseph) (Entered: 08/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in support re 15 Motion for summary judgment filed by EMI Yoshi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Schwartz, Robert) (Entered: 08/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M. Schwartz on behalf of EMI Yoshi (Schwartz, Robert) (Entered: 08/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ENDORSED ORDER granting 35 Motion for leave to file reply brief. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 8/9/2010. (LN) (Entered: 08/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for leave to file Reply Brief in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment by EMI Yoshi. (Schwartz, Robert) (Entered: 08/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint, Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Hurricane Shooters, LLC by EMI Yoshi. (Schwartz, Robert) (Entered: 08/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot 16 Plaintiff's Motion to dismiss and strike. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 8/3/2010. (LN) (Entered: 08/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED ORDER granting 28 Motion for leave to file First Amended Answer and Counter-Claim. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 8/3/2010. (LN) (Entered: 08/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in opposition re 15 MOTION for summary judgment of patent invalidity filed by Hurricane Shooters, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Jakes, Frank) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED ORDER granting 29 Motion for extension of time to file response/reply Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 7/30/2010. (JG) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Consent MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to 15 MOTION for summary judgment of patent invalidity Consented Motion for One Day Enlargement of Time for Plaintiff to Respond to Defendant's Motion by Hurricane Shooters, LLC. (Jakes, Frank) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Consent MOTION for leave to file First Amended Answer and Counterclaim by EMI Yoshi. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed First Amended Answer and Counterclaim)(Schwartz, Robert) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in opposition re 16 MOTION to dismiss Counts II & III of Defendant's Counterclaim MOTION to strike Defendant's Third, Fourth & Fifth Affirmative Defenses filed by EMI Yoshi. (Schwartz, Robert) (Entered: 07/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COUNSEL NOTIFIED TO REFILE USING CORRECT EVENT CODES AND ATTORNEY SIGNATURES. RESPONSE in opposition re 16 MOTION to dismiss Counts II & III of Defendant's Counterclaim MOTION to strike Defendant's Third, Fourth & Fifth Affirmative Defenses ; and Motion for Leave to file First Amended Answer and Counterclaim filed by EMI Yoshi. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed First Amended Answer and Counterclaim)(Schwartz, Robert) Modified on 7/28/2010 (BSN). (Entered: 07/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Fact Discovery due by 4/26/2011. Dispositive motions due by 7/15/2011. Pretrial Conference set for THURSDAY, 10/6/2011 at 9:30 AM in Tampa Courtroom 13A before Judge James S. Moody Jr. *** Jury Trial set for NOVEMBER 2011 *** Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 7/27/2010. (LN) (Entered: 07/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 22 Order to show cause filed by Hurricane Shooters, LLC. (Jakes, Frank) (Entered: 07/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Jakes, Frank) (Entered: 07/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Re: parties' failure to file a Case Management Report. Show Cause Response due within 11 days. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 7/21/2010. (LN) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ENDORSED ORDER granting 20 Defendant's motion on consent for extension of time to 7/27/10 to answer or otherwise plead and to oppose Plaintiff's motion to dismiss counts II and III of Defendant's counterclaims and to strike Defendant's third, fourth and fifth affirmative defenses. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 7/20/2010. (SMB) (Entered: 07/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Consent MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to 16 MOTION to dismiss Counts II & III of Defendant's Counterclaim MOTION to strike Defendant's Third, Fourth & Fifth Affirmative Defenses by EMI Yoshi. (Schwartz, Robert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. (Entered: 07/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED ORDER granting 18 Plaintiff's Motion for extension of time to file response to 15 Motion for Summary Judgment. Response due by 7/30/2010. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 7/19/2010. (LN) (Entered: 07/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Consent MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to 15 MOTION for summary judgment of patent invalidity by Hurricane Shooters, LLC. (Jakes, Frank) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. (Entered: 07/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to 10 Counterclaim by Hurricane Shooters, LLC. Related document: 10 Answer to complaintCounterclaim filed by EMI Yoshi.(Weissman, Joseph) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to dismiss Counts II & III of Defendant's Counterclaim, MOTION to strike Defendant's Third, Fourth & Fifth Affirmative Defenses by Hurricane Shooters, LLC. (Weissman, Joseph) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/30/2010, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for summary judgment of patent invalidity by EMI Yoshi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(Schwartz, Robert) (Entered: 06/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED ORDER granting 13 Motion to extend time to respond to Defendant's counterclaim. Extension granted through July 6, 2010. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 6/16/2010. (LN) (Entered: 06/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Consent MOTION to extend time to Respond to Defendant's Counterclaim by Hurricane Shooters, LLC. (Jakes, Frank) (Entered: 06/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 11 motion to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 6/11/2010. (JMSC) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/10/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Walter D. Ames to appear pro hac vice by EMI Yoshi. (Schwartz, Robert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. (Entered: 06/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Hurricane Shooters, LLC by EMI Yoshi.(Schwartz, Robert) (Entered: 05/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED ORDER granting 8 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time. The Defendant shall file an answer or responsive pleading no later than May 26, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 5/6/2010.(Porcelli, Anthony) (Entered: 05/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to 1 Complaint by EMI Yoshi. (Long, S.) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. (Entered: 05/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED ORDER denying 6 Plaintiff's Motion to transfer case. Judge Lazzara declined to accept transfer. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 4/29/2010. (LN) (Entered: 04/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to transfer case by Hurricane Shooters, LLC. (Jakes, Frank) (Entered: 04/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RETURN of service executed on 4/15/2010 by Hurricane Shooters, LLC as to EMI Yoshi. (Jakes, Frank) (Entered: 04/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2 issued by Deputy Clerk on 4/2/2010. (SMB) (Entered: 04/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/1/2010, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Summons issued as to EMI Yoshi. (BSN) (Entered: 04/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 155 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JUDGMENT in favor of Hurricane Shooters, LLC against EMI Yoshi, Inc. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 11/18/2011. (SMB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint) (BSN) (Entered: 04/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 100 Filed: 10/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying 87 Plaintiff's Amended Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 9/8/2011. (LN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/31/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against EMI Yoshi with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number T054748) filed by Hurricane Shooters, LLC.(BSN) (Entered: 04/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 73 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?