Hoffman v. Flores et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Middle District Court, Case No. 3:10-cv-00610
District Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr., presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Kelvin R. Hoffman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by St. Johns Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas Nelson Burnett +1 904 495 0400 +1 904 495 0506 dburnett@sjlawgroup.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy Marie Vo +1 904 495 0400 +1 904 495 0506 avo@sjlawgroup.com
v.
No Logo Benton, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Capitol Station

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lance Eric Neff +1 850 414 3300 +1 850 488 4872 Lance.Neff@myfloridalegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Florida Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joe Belitzky +1 850 414 3300 +1 856 488 4872 joe_belitzky@oag.state.fl.us
No Logo D. L. Northcutt, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Capitol Station

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lance Eric Neff +1 850 414 3300 +1 850 488 4872 Lance.Neff@myfloridalegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Florida Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joe Belitzky +1 850 414 3300 +1 856 488 4872 joe_belitzky@oag.state.fl.us
No Logo Florida Department of Corrections, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Capitol Station

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lance Eric Neff +1 850 414 3300 +1 850 488 4872 Lance.Neff@myfloridalegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Florida Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joe Belitzky +1 850 414 3300 +1 856 488 4872 joe_belitzky@oag.state.fl.us
No Logo J. Bennett, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Capitol Station

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lance Eric Neff +1 850 414 3300 +1 850 488 4872 Lance.Neff@myfloridalegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Florida Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joe Belitzky +1 850 414 3300 +1 856 488 4872 joe_belitzky@oag.state.fl.us
No Logo M. Ficken, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Capitol Station

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lance Eric Neff +1 850 414 3300 +1 850 488 4872 Lance.Neff@myfloridalegal.com
No Logo Melody Flores, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Capitol Station

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lance Eric Neff +1 850 414 3300 +1 850 488 4872 Lance.Neff@myfloridalegal.com
No Logo Ronald R Johnson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Capitol Station

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lance Eric Neff +1 850 414 3300 +1 850 488 4872 Lance.Neff@myfloridalegal.com
No Logo Sam A. Bassett, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Capitol Station

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lance Eric Neff +1 850 414 3300 +1 850 488 4872 Lance.Neff@myfloridalegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Florida Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joe Belitzky +1 850 414 3300 +1 856 488 4872 joe_belitzky@oag.state.fl.us
No Logo Walter A. McNeil, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Capitol Station

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lance Eric Neff +1 850 414 3300 +1 850 488 4872 Lance.Neff@myfloridalegal.com
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 555 - Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
  Entries (36) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 65 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying 43 Motion for summary judgment; terminating 63 Motion for summary judgment, however, the motion will be construed to be a response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 64 Motion to strike, with instructions to the Clerk; denying as moot 64 motion to deny Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 12/19/2012. (LDO)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER granting 32 Motion to withdraw ; granting in part 33 Motion for extension of scheduling order deadlines; denying as moot 34 Motion to continue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 12/20/2011. (LDO) (Entered: 12/21/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/13/2011, Entered: None
      MOTION to continue re 28 Order by Kelvin R. Hoffman. (Filed Pro Se) (MDC) (Entered: 12/13/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
        JOINT Motion To Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines by All Plaintiffs. (Vo, Amy) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. (Modified on 12/13/2011 to edit text) (DSY). (Entered: 12/12/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 32 Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: None
          MOTION to withdraw by Kelvin R. Hoffman. (Vo, Amy) (Entered: 11/16/2011)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/26/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER denying 29 Motion for attorney fees. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 10/26/2011. (LDO) (Entered: 10/26/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/17/2011, Entered: None
              RESPONSE to motion re 29 MOTION for attorney fees filed by Kelvin R. Hoffman. (Vo, Amy) (Entered: 10/17/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                MOTION for attorney fees by Sam A. Bassett. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B)(Neff, Lance) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. Modified on 9/22/2011 (MK). Counsel notified of correct case number for all future pleadings. (Entered: 09/21/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER setting deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 9/14/2011. (LDO) (Entered: 09/15/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None
                    ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to 15 Amended complaint by Sam A. Bassett, Florida Department of Corrections.(Neff, Lance) (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 26 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER granting 22 Motion to dismiss, and Defendant Melody Flores is dismissed from this action; granting 16 Motion to dismiss to the extent the claim against Defendant Bassett in Count II will be dismissed; the claims against Defendants FDOC and McNeil in Counts III and V will be dismissed without prejudice; plaintiff may not seek monetary damages from Defendants FDOC and McNeil, in their official capacities, under 1983, for a civil rights violation; and Defendant Walter A. McNeil is dismissed from this action; denying 16 motion to dismiss in all other respects; Defendants Bassett and FDOC shall respond to the remaining claims against them in the amended complaint (Counts I and VI) within 30 days. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 9/6/2011. (LDO) (Entered: 09/06/2011)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: None
                        RESPONSE to motion re 22 MOTION to dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Kelvin R. Hoffman. (Vo, Amy) (Entered: 06/27/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/16/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER granting 23 Motion to extend time, plaintiff shall respond to the motion to dismiss on or before June 28, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 6/15/2011. (LDO) (Entered: 06/16/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                            MOTION to extend time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss by Kelvin R. Hoffman. (Vo, Amy) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. (Entered: 06/13/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/23/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                              MOTION to dismiss Amended Complaint by Melody Flores. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B)(Neff, Lance) (Entered: 05/23/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER for defendant Melody Flores to respond to the amended complaint within 20 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 5/19/2011. (LDO) (Entered: 05/19/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  Case Reassigned to Roy B. Dalton. New case number: 3:10-cv-610-J-37JBT. Judge Timothy J. Corrigan no longer assigned to the case. (SHS) (Entered: 05/11/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/12/2011, Entered: None
                                    RESPONSE to motion re 16 MOTION to dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Kelvin R. Hoffman. (Vo, Amy) (Entered: 02/12/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER granting 17 motion for extension of time and requiring Plaintiff to file his respons to the motion to dismiss on or before February 11, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 1/31/2011. (DD) (Entered: 01/31/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to 16 MOTION to dismiss Amended Complaint by Kelvin R. Hoffman. (Vo, Amy) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. (Entered: 01/03/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                          MOTION to dismiss Amended Complaint by Sam A. Bassett, Florida Department of Corrections, Walter A. McNeil. (Neff, Lance) (Entered: 12/17/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None
                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT against Sam A. Bassett, M. L. Flores, Florida Department of Corrections, Walter A. McNeil filed by Kelvin R. Hoffman. Related document: 2 Complaint.(Vo, Amy) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER granting 13 motion for leave to amend and finding as moot 8 motion to dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 11/1/2010. (DD) (Entered: 11/02/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                RESPONSE to motion re 8 MOTION to dismiss Complaint filed by Kelvin R. Hoffman. (Vo, Amy) (Entered: 10/07/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER granting 10 motion for extension of time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 9/17/2010. (DD) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                    CERTIFICATE of Conferring with Opposing Counsel by Kelvin R. Hoffman re 10 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to 8 MOTION to dismiss Complaint, 9 Order MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to 8 MOTION to dismiss Complaint, 9 Order (Vo, Amy) Modified on 9/10/2010 (to edit text) (TS). (Entered: 09/09/2010)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to 8 MOTION to dismiss Complaint, 9 Order by Kelvin R. Hoffman. (Burnett, Douglas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. Modified on 9/9/2010 (Counsel notified to include case number on all future filings)(TS). (Entered: 09/08/2010)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 8/9/2010. (DD) (Entered: 08/09/2010)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/4/2010, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                          MOTION to dismiss Complaint by Sam A. Bassett, J. Bennett, Benton, M. Ficken, Florida Department of Corrections, Ronald R. Johnson, D. L. Northcutt. (Neff, Lance) (Entered: 08/04/2010)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE by Sam A. Bassett, J. Bennett, Benton, M. Ficken, Florida Department of Corrections, Ronald R. Johnson, D. L. Northcutt re 5 Order (Neff, Lance) (Entered: 07/23/2010)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Lance Eric Neff on behalf of Sam A. Bassett, J. Bennett, Benton, M. Ficken, Florida Department of Corrections, Ronald R. Johnson, D. L. Northcutt (Neff, Lance) (Entered: 07/23/2010)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 7/20/2010. (DD) (Entered: 07/21/2010)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 7/19/2010. (MGG) (Entered: 07/19/2010)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    AMENDED STANDING ORDER - Filing of Documents that Exceed Twenty-Five Pages. Signed by all Jacksonville Judges on 5/25/05. (TS) (Entered: 07/16/2010)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                      COMPLAINT against Baker Correctional Institution, Sam A. Bassett, J. Bennett, Benton, M. Ficken, M. L. Flores, Florida Department of Corrections, Kenneth Gale, Ronald R. Johnson, D. L. Northcutt filed by Kelvin R. Hoffman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Filed in State Court)(TS) (Entered: 07/16/2010)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial Circuit, In and For Baker County, Florida, case number 02-2010-CA-64 filed in State Court on 2/26/2010. Filing fee $ 350, receipt number J35532 filed by J. Bennett, Benton, Florida Department of Corrections, D. L. Northcutt, Sam A. Bassett. (CD with pdf documents received)(TS) (Entered: 07/16/2010)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                          Statistics

                                                                          This case has been viewed 133 times.

                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                          Space
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                           
                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                          Need Password Help?