THOMPSON v FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Northern District Court, Case No. 3:10-cv-00074
Magistrate Judge M. Casey Rodgers, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ALVIN C THOMPSON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ALVIN C THOMPSON
v.
No Logo Florida Department of Corrections, Defendant
No Logo G R BYRD, Defendant

Represented by Capitol Station

No Logo R QUINN, Defendant

Represented by Capitol Station

Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 555 - Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 83 Filed: 11/24/2011, Entered: None
ORDER adopting the magistrate judge's 82 Report and Recommendation. Defendants' motion to dismiss (doc. 58) is GRANTED. This cause be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as malicious pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1915(e)(2)(B )(i) for plaintiff's abuse of the judicial process. Plaintiffs 68 Motion to Dismiss Dismissal of Complaint by Defendants' Undersigned Counsel with Leave of Court to Amend Complaint Disclosing Prior Filings is DENIED. Plaintiffs " ;Amended Motion to Dismiss Dismissal of Complaint by Defendants' Undersigned Counsel with Leave of Court to Amend Complaint disclosing Prior Filings to Include Appeals" (doc. 80 ) is DENIED. Defendants' motion to strike (doc. 79 ) is DENIED. All other pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 11/23/2011. (djb)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None
    NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC MATTHEW NEIBERGER on behalf of G R BYRD, R QUINN (NEIBERGER, ERIC) (Entered: 02/04/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/1/2011, Entered: None
      NOTICE of Appearance by MARCUS OWEN GRAPER on behalf of G R BYRD, R QUINN (GRAPER, MARCUS) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None
        SUMMONS Returned Executed on G R BYRD served 1/14/2011, answer due 3/15/2011. (kvg) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None
          SUMMONS Returned Executed on R QUINN served 1/14/2011, answer due 3/15/2011. (kvg) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None Summons Issued
            Summons Issued as to G R BYRD, R QUINN and forwarded to USMS - pursuant to 28 Order. (laj) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: None
              ORDER Re: 11 Amended Complaint - 1) The docket shall reflect that there are (2) Dfts in this action: R. Quinn and G.R. Byrd. 2) The Clerk shall issue summonses, indicating that Dfts have (60) days in which to file a Response to the Amended Complaint, and refer the summonses to USMS, along with the service copies of Pla's Amended Complaint and a copy of this Order for each Dft. 3) If service is returned unexecuted, or if a return is not filed w/in (45) days from the date of this Order, the Clerk of Court shall immediately notify chambers. 4) The clerk shall forward to Pla a magistrate consent form, w/the case number written on it. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MILES DAVIS on 12/22/2010. ***Copies and summonses provided to USMS - Clerk shall notify chambers by 2/7/2011. (laj) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/29/2010, Entered: None
                ORDER. The clerk shall change the docket to reflect that there are two dfts in this action: R. Quinn and G. R. Byrd. Within (28) days from the date of this order, pla shall submit two identical service copies of his amended complaint, including attachments. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MILES DAVIS on November 29, 2010. (2 complete service copies by 12/27/2010) (kvg) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: None
                  ORDER - Plaintiff's 12 Motion to Appoint Counsel is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MILES DAVIS on 11/17/2010. (djb) (Entered: 11/17/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/8/2010, Entered: None
                    RESPONSE by clerk, re 23 Notice/Letter of Inquiry. (cbj) (Entered: 09/08/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/2/2010, Entered: None
                      NOTICE/LETTER Of Inquiry by ALVIN C THOMPSON re 22 Initial Filing Fee and case status. (cbj) (Entered: 09/08/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: None
                        INITIAL PARTIAL Filing fee: $ 13.00, receipt number FLN3...4281 (cbj) Modified on 7/16/2010 (copy to pla) (cbj). (Entered: 07/16/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: None
                          ORDER - - Granted, 20 MOTION for Extension of Time filed by ALVIN C THOMPSON. - - Pla shall pay initial partial filing fee on or before August 11, 2010. - - (Initial Partial Fee due by 8/11/2010. ) - - - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MILES DAVIS on July 12, 2010. (cbj) (Entered: 07/12/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/8/2010, Entered: None
                            MOTION for Extension of Time (to pay initial partial filing fee) by ALVIN C THOMPSON. (cbj) (Entered: 07/08/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/10/2010, Entered: None
                              ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS - Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of ALVIN C. THOMPSON re 11 Amended Complaint. - - Pla's 18 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is Granted to extent that case may proceed w/o prepayment of entire filing fee. - $12.50 is assessed as Initial Partial Filing Fee (total fee this case is $350.00). - Pla shall have thirty (30) days to submit initial partial fee. - Clerk shall mail copy of this order w/appropriate cover letter to: FL DOC, 2601 Blair Stone Rd., Tallahassee, FL 32399-2500, Attn: Agency Clerk. - No further action until initial partial fee is received. - - (Initial Partial Fee due by 7/12/2010. ) - - - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MILES DAVIS on June 10, 2010.- - (cc: FL DOC w/letter) (cbj) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: None
                                MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ALVIN C THOMPSON. (cbj) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/21/2010, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE of Change of Address by ALVIN C THOMPSON, #111972 to Santa Rosa Correctional Institutional, 5850 E. Milton Rd, Milton, FL 32583. - (no change to docket required) (cbj) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: None
                                    ORDER re 15 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by ALVIN C THOMPSON. - On or before June 14, 2010 plaintiff shall either pay the $350.00 filing fee, or submit a complete application to proceed IFP as instructed in this court's March 23, 2010 order 9 . Failure to do so will result in a recommendation that this case be dismissed for failure to comply with an order of the court. - - (Filing Fee due by 6/14/2010 ; Alternatively, IFP Motion due by 6/14/2010. ) - - - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MILES DAVIS on May 12, 2010. (cbj) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: None
                                      RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE titled "Clerk," by ALVIN C THOMPSON. (cbj) (Entered: 05/11/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank 14 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None
                                        ORDER (Of Deficiency) - re plaintiff's document noting "Clerk (Rushing)! to get it to you," (received 4/30/2010) - - The submitted hard copy of the document shall be returned to you by the Clerk without electronic filing. It may be resubmitted after the above noted deficiencies are corrected. - - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MILES DAVIS on May 3, 2010. - - (doc returned to pla) (cbj) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: None
                                          MOTION Requesting Appointment of Counsel by ALVIN C THOMPSON. (cbj) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Blank 11 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: None, Terminated: 6/10/2010
                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT against FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS (naming R QUINN, G R BYRD as defendants), filed by ALVIN C THOMPSON.- - (no copies provided) (cbj) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: None
                                              ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - - Plaintiff shall have fourteen (14) days from the date of this order to show cause why this case should not be dismissed for failure to comply with an order of the court. - - Show Cause Response due by 5/13/2010. - - - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MILES DAVIS on April 29, 2010. (cbj) (Entered: 04/29/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                ORDER re 1 Complaint filed by ALVIN C THOMPSON, 5 Order transferring to this court. - - 1. Clerk to send pla a § 1983 complaint form and an IFP application. This case number should be written on the forms. - 2. Pla shall file Amended Complaint within twenty-eight (28) days on court form. - 3. Within same time period, pla shall either pay $350 filing fee, or file complete application to proceed IFP. - - - (Amended Pleadings due by 4/20/2010. - Filing Fee due by 4/20/2010 ; Alternatively IFP Motion due by 4/20/2010. ) - - - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MILES DAVIS on March 23, 2010.- - (forms to pla) (cbj) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                  Notice to Pro Se mailed to plaintiff ALVIN C THOMPSON (advising of new district, division and case number). (cbj) (Entered: 03/16/2010)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                    Case "electronically" transferred in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 1:10-cv-20076. Original (electronic) file with documents numbered 1 - 5; certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet 6 received. - - *Modified on 3/16/2010 (to reflect electronic transfer) (cbj). (Entered: 03/16/2010)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and transferring case to the Northern District of Florida. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 2/25/10. (tm) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 3/16/2010.] (Entered: 02/26/2010)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on 42 USC 1983 case re 1 Complaint filed by Alvin C. Thompson. Recommending that the case be transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Florida, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1406(a). Objections to R&R due by 2/12/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 1/26/2010. (tw) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 3/16/2010.] (Entered: 01/26/2010)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          Clerks Notice Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White (rb) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 3/16/2010.] (Entered: 01/08/2010)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment on Electronic Case to Judge Marcia G. Cooke and Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White (rb) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 3/16/2010.] (Entered: 01/08/2010)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/8/2010, Entered: None
                                                              CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT 42 USC 1983 against Florida Department of Corrections.. IFP Filed, filed by Alvin C. Thompson.(rb) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 3/16/2010.] (Entered: 01/08/2010)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 88 times.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?