JOHNSON v. FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Northern District Court, Case No. 4:10-cv-00570
District Judge Robert L. Hinkle, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo CHARLES JOHNSON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Florida Justice Institute, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/22/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY Randall Challen Berg, Jr. +1 305 358 2081 +1 305 358 0910 rberg@floridajusticeinstitute.org
TERMINATED: 09/22/2011 JOSHUA AARON GLICKMAN +1 305 358 2081 +1 305 358 0910 josh@sjlawcollective.com

Toggle Switch Represented by JACKSONVILLE AREA LEGAL AID - JACKSONVILLE FL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/22/2011 SHARON CASERTA +1 904 353 1320 +1 904 356 8285 sharon.caserta@jaxlegalaid.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Uniroyal Goodrich Tire Company

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles Johnson +1 651 635 7702
v.
No Logo Florida Department of Corrections, Defendant
No Logo MARTIE TAYLOR, Defendant
No Logo WALTER MCNEIL, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 794
Nature of Suit 446 - Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities Act - Other
  Entries (51) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None
ORDER GRANTING 50 LEAVE TO WITHDRAW. Attorney JOSHUA AARON GLICKMAN; SHAWN ALEX HELLER; RANDALL CHALLEN BERG and SHARON CASERTA terminated. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 9/22/11. **Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (pll) (Entered: 09/23/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/17/2011, Entered: None
    MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by CHARLES JOHNSON. (BERG, RANDALL) (Entered: 09/17/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: None
      ORDER ON NOTICE OF CONFLICT, re 48 Notice (Other). Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 08/17/2011. (krb) (Entered: 08/18/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: None
        NOTICE of Scheduling Conflict by FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS re 46 Scheduling Order, Case Referred to Mediation,, (SANFORD, JONATHAN) (Entered: 08/15/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
          AMENDED ANSWER to 17 Amended Complaint by FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS. (SANFORD, JONATHAN) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/30/2011, Entered: None
            SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER: (Discovery due by 1/6/2012. Summary-Judgment Motions to be filed by 1/27/2012. Jury Trial set for the trial period that begins on 5/7/2012 at 08:15 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE.) Case referred to mediation. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 07/30/2011. (krb) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: None
              REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (GLICKMAN, JOSHUA) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/20/2011, Entered: None
                ORDER DENYING 32 MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 7/20/11. (pll) (Entered: 07/20/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Time Records by CHARLES JOHNSON re 42 Attorney Time Records - Sealed Portion (Ex Parte) (BERG, RANDALL) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: None
                    ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by CHARLES JOHNSON. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Shawn A. Heller Time Record, # 2 Exhibit Joshua A. Glickman Time Record) (BERG, RANDALL) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: None
                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 32 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies filed by CHARLES JOHNSON. (GLICKMAN, JOSHUA) (Entered: 07/11/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/28/2011, Entered: None
                        ORDER, GRANTING 38 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, as to 32 MOTION to Dismiss. (Notify Chambers on 7/11/2011.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WILLIAM C SHERRILL, JR on 06/28/2011. (krb) (Entered: 06/29/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/25/2011, Entered: None
                          ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO THE MOTION TO DISMISS, GRANTING 38 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, as to 32 MOTION to Dismiss . (Internal deadline for referral to judge if Plaintiff's Response not filed earlier: 7/11/2011). Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 06/25/2011. (krb) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/22/2011, Entered: None
                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 32 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies (Unopposed) by CHARLES JOHNSON. (HELLER, SHAWN) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/18/2011, Entered: None
                              ORDER DENYING 11 MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 6/18/11. (pll) (Entered: 06/20/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/18/2011, Entered: None
                                ORDER PROHIBITING THE FILING OF MONTHLY ATTORNEY-FEE RECORDS. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 6/18/11. (pll) (Entered: 06/20/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/15/2011, Entered: None
                                  ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by CHARLES JOHNSON. (CASERTA, SHARON) (Entered: 06/15/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/15/2011, Entered: None
                                    ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by CHARLES JOHNSON. (CASERTA, SHARON) (Entered: 06/15/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/10/2011, Entered: None
                                      RESPONSE to Motion re 11 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 4:07-CV-474-SPM/WCS, 4:10-CV-569-SPM/WCS and 4:10-CV-570-SPM/WCS filed by FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS. (SANFORD, JONATHAN) (Entered: 06/10/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/10/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                        MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies by FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 6/28/2011). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D) (SANFORD, JONATHAN) (Entered: 06/10/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/9/2011, Entered: None
                                          INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 06/09/2011. (Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 6/23/2011. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/25/2011. Discovery due by 10/7/2011.) (krb) (Entered: 06/10/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: None
                                            ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to DISTRICT JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE for all further proceedings. CHIEF JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE no longer assigned to case. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 6/3/2011. The judges initials for this case are now RH/WCS. (amm) (Entered: 06/03/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER granting 28 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to the amended complaint and to 11 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 4:07-CV-474-SPM/WCS, 4:10-CV-569-SPM/WCS and 4:10-CV-570-SPM/WCS ( (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 6/10/2011).) The time is extended to June 10, 2011. s/ William C. Sherrill, Jr.United States Magistrate Judge (wcs, Tallahassee) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 17 Amended Complaint, 11 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 4:07-CV-474-SPM/WCS, 4:10-CV-569-SPM/WCS and 4:10-CV-570-SPM/WCS , Unopposed by FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS. (SANFORD, JONATHAN) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                  STATEMENT OF FACTS Clarifying Identity of Plaintiff Charles Johnson Re: 24 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,. (BERG, RANDALL) (Entered: 05/13/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                    ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by CHARLES JOHNSON. (CASERTA, SHARON) (Entered: 05/13/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                      ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by CHARLES JOHNSON. (CASERTA, SHARON) (Entered: 05/13/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                        ORDER. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response to 11 Motion to Consolidate not filed earlier: 5/31/2011)., Miscellaneous Deadline for a statement clarifying his identity - by 5/13/2011., Motions to Dismiss due by 5/31/2011.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WILLIAM C SHERRILL, JR on 5/3/11. (pll) (Entered: 05/04/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                          ANSWER to 17 Amended Complaint by FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS. (SANFORD, JONATHAN) (Entered: 04/15/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                            ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by CHARLES JOHNSON. (CASERTA, SHARON) (Entered: 04/15/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                              ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by CHARLES JOHNSON. (CASERTA, SHARON) (Entered: 04/15/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by CHARLES JOHNSON. (Attachments: # 1 Dante P. Trevisani, Esq.) (BERG, RANDALL) (Entered: 04/13/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                  ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by CHARLES JOHNSON. (BERG, RANDALL) (Entered: 04/13/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                    ORDER, re 17 Amended Complaint. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if Defendant's Response to the amended complaint - not filed earlier: 4/15/2011). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WILLIAM C SHERRILL, JR on 03/31/2011. (krb) (Entered: 04/01/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Blank 17 Filed: 3/24/2011, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                      FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, filed by CHARLES JOHNSON. (HELLER, SHAWN) (Entered: 03/24/2011)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER granting 15 Motion to Extend Time. The time to respond to the complaint is extended to March 25, 2011. s/ William C. Sherrill, Jr.United States Magistrate Judge (wcs, Tallahassee) (Entered: 03/23/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                          MOTION to Extend Time , Unopposed by FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, WALTER MCNEIL, MARTIE TAYLOR. (SANFORD, JONATHAN) (Entered: 03/21/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting 13 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time. The time to respond to the complaint is extended to March 21, 2011. s/ William C. Sherrill, Jr.United States Magistrate Judge (wcs, Tallahassee) (WCS) (Entered: 03/14/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                              MOTION to Extend Time , Unopposed by FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, WALTER MCNEIL, MARTIE TAYLOR. (SANFORD, JONATHAN) (Entered: 03/11/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CHARLES JOHNSON. All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Waiver of Service of Summons by Defendant Taylor, # 2 Exhibit Waiver of Service of Summons by Defendant McNeil, # 3 Exhibit Waiver of Service of Summons by Defendant FDOC) (BERG, RANDALL) (Entered: 02/18/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                  MOTION to Consolidate Cases 4:07-CV-474-SPM/WCS, 4:10-CV-569-SPM/WCS and 4:10-CV-570-SPM/WCS by CHARLES JOHNSON. (BERG, RANDALL) (Entered: 01/11/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                    Summons Issued as to FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, WALTER MCNEIL, MARTIE TAYLOR. (Attachments: # 1 Summons issued to WALTER MCNEIL, # 2 Summons issued to MARTIE TAYLOR) (kdm) (Entered: 01/05/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING SUMMONS TO MARTIE TAYLOR, IN HER OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITY ACT COORDINATOR FOR THE FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS by CHARLES JOHNSON (BERG, RANDALL) (Entered: 01/05/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING SUMMONS TO WALTER MCNEIL, IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS SECRETARY OF THE FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS by CHARLES JOHNSON (BERG, RANDALL) (Entered: 01/05/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING SUMMONS TO FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS by CHARLES JOHNSON (BERG, RANDALL) (Entered: 01/05/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by SHARON CASERTA on behalf of CHARLES JOHNSON (CASERTA, SHARON) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by JOSHUA AARON GLICKMAN on behalf of CHARLES JOHNSON (GLICKMAN, JOSHUA) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by SHAWN ALEX HELLER on behalf of CHARLES JOHNSON (HELLER, SHAWN) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                  NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF OTHER OR PRIOR SIMILAR ACTIONS by CHARLES JOHNSON (BERG, RANDALL) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                    CIVIL COVER SHEET. (BERG, RANDALL) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                      COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, WALTER MCNEIL, MARTIE TAYLOR ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 1129-1765682.), filed by CHARLES JOHNSON. (BERG, RANDALL) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 449 times.

                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                         
                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                        Need Password Help?