Figueroa v. Merscorp, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Southern District Court, Case No. 0:10-cv-61296
District Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ignacio Damian Figueroa, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Eric Trent +1 954 567 5877 +5675 567 567 5872 trentlawoffice@yahoo.com
v.
No Logo American Land Title Association, Defendant
No Logo Bank of America Bank, N.A., Defendant
Bank of America, NA Bank of America, NA, Defendant
Unknown Role, Oneida Ltd.
Unknown Role, NATIONSBANK CORP
Unknown Role, Nb Holdings Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Liebler Gonzalez & Portuondo PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Juan Aedo Gonzalez +1 305 379 0400 +3799 379 379 9626 jag@lgplaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shutts & Bowen, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Gerald Fracasso, Jr. +1 305 358 6300 +3819 381 381 9982 rfracasso@shutts-law.com
No Logo CCO Mortgage Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Chase Home Mortgage Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Citimortgage, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Adams and Reese LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Louis Mario Ursini, III +1 941 316 7600 +3167 316 316 7914 louis.ursini@arlaw.com
No Logo Corinthian Mortgage Corporation, Defendant
No Logo CRE Finance Council, Defendant
No Logo David J. Stern, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Tew Cardenas LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey A. Tew +1 305 536 8452 +1 305 536 1116 jt@tewlaw.com
No Logo DJSP Enterprises, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Everhome Mortgage Company, Defendant
No Logo Federal National Mortgage Association, Defendant
Officially listed as "Fannie Mae"
No Logo First American Title Insurance Company, Defendant
No Logo Freddie Mac, Defendant
No Logo GMAC Residential Funding Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Guaranty Bank, Defendant
HSBC Finance Corporation HSBC Finance Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Squire Sanders (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason Daniel Joffe +1 561 650 7200 +1 561 655 1509 jason.joffe@squiresanders.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Traci Hope Rollins +1 561 650 7256 +6551 655 655 1509 Trollins@ssd.com
JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA, Defendant
Officially listed as "JP Morgan Chase & Co."

Toggle Switch Represented by Burke Warren MacKay & Serritella, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Danielle Jean Szukala +1 312 840 7000 +1 312 840 7900 dszukala@burkelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Campbell Law Firm PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dennis Michael Campbell +1 305 444 6040 +1 305 444 6041 dcampbell@campbelllawfirm.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen & Bobotas

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle Anne McClaskey +1 305 371 8177 +1 305 358 0638 michelle@cohenandbobotas.com
No Logo Law Offices of David J.Stern PA, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Tew Cardenas LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey A. Tew +1 305 536 8452 +1 305 536 1116 jt@tewlaw.com
Merrill Lynch & Company, Inc. Merrill Lynch & Company, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Merrill Lynch Credit Corporation"

Toggle Switch Represented by Liebler Gonzalez & Portuondo PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Juan Aedo Gonzalez +1 305 379 0400 +3799 379 379 9626 jag@lgplaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shutts & Bowen, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Gerald Fracasso, Jr. +1 305 358 6300 +3819 381 381 9982 rfracasso@shutts-law.com
No Logo Merscorp, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Benjamin Boese +1 305 415 3000 +1 305 415 3001 aboese@morganlewis.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Mark Brochin +1 305 415 3456 +1 305 415 3001 bobby.brochin@morganlewis.com
No Logo MGIC Investor Services, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Murai, Wald, Biondo & Moreno, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lynette Ebeoglu McGuinness +1 305 444 0101 +1 305 444 0174 lmcguinness@mwbm.com
No Logo Mortgage Bankers Association, Defendant
No Logo Nationwide Advantage Mortgage Company, Defendant
No Logo Pmi Mortgage Insurance Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul F. Hancock +1 202 514 4715
No Logo Stewart Title Guaranty Company, Defendant
No Logo Suntrust Mortgage, Inc., Defendant
No Logo United Guaranty Corporation, Defendant
Wells Fargo Bank, NA Wells Fargo Bank, NA, Defendant
Unknown Role, NORWEST CORP
Unknown Role, Day Runner, Inc.
Unknown Role, Yucca Uranium Inc
Unknown Role, Munienhanced Fund Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Carlton Fields, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Keith Winston +1 561 659 7070 +1 561 659 7368 mwinston@carltonfields.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Liebler Gonzalez & Portuondo PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Juan Aedo Gonzalez +1 305 379 0400 +3799 379 379 9626 jag@lgplaw.com
No Logo WMC Mortgage Corp., Defendant
No Logo Wmc Mortgage Corporation, Defendant
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1964
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (190) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Blank 184 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: 1/31/2011 Order on Motion to Dismiss
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: 1/28/2011 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: 1/25/2011 Reply to Response to Motion
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: 1/21/2011 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 1/11/2011, Entered: 1/11/2011 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: 1/10/2011 ~Notice (other)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: 1/7/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response-Reply
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: 1/6/2011 Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: 1/6/2011 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 12/27/2010, Entered: 12/27/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response-Reply
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: 12/23/2010 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: 12/23/2010 Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 12/16/2010, Entered: 12/16/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response-Reply
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 12/16/2010, Entered: 12/16/2010 Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: 12/15/2010 Certificate of Interested Party
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: 12/15/2010 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: 12/15/2010 Order on Motion to Adopt/Join
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 12/14/2010, Entered: 12/14/2010 Motion to Adopt/Join
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 12/14/2010, Entered: 12/14/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 12/10/2010, Entered: 12/10/2010 Order
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: 12/6/2010 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: 12/6/2010 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: 12/2/2010 Motion to Dismiss
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 11/30/2010, Entered: 11/30/2010 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: 11/30/2010 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: 11/23/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: 11/22/2010 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: 11/22/2010 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: 11/22/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: 11/19/2010 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: 11/19/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 11/18/2010, Entered: 11/18/2010 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: 11/16/2010 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: 11/16/2010 Order to Show Cause
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Certificate of Interested Party
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: 11/8/2010 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: 11/8/2010 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: 11/8/2010 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 11/2/2010, Entered: 11/5/2010 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/5/2010 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/5/2010 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 11/5/2010, Entered: 11/5/2010 Summons Reissued
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: 11/5/2010 Order on Unstipulated Motion for Substitution of Counsel
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: 11/4/2010 Certificate of Interested Party
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: 11/4/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: 11/4/2010 UNSTIPULATED MOTION for Substitution of Counsel
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: 11/4/2010 Summons Reissued
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: 11/4/2010 Notice of Striking
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: 11/4/2010 Acknowledgment of Service
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 11/2/2010, Entered: 11/2/2010 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: 11/1/2010 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 10/28/2010, Entered: 10/28/2010 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 10/27/2010, Entered: 10/28/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 10/28/2010, Entered: 10/28/2010 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 10/27/2010, Entered: 10/27/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 10/27/2010, Entered: 10/27/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 10/27/2010, Entered: 10/27/2010 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: 10/27/2010 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 10/27/2010, Entered: 10/27/2010 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 10/27/2010, Entered: 10/27/2010 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 10/27/2010, Entered: 10/27/2010 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 10/22/2010, Entered: 10/26/2010 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 10/22/2010, Entered: 10/26/2010 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 10/22/2010, Entered: 10/26/2010 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: 10/26/2010 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: 10/26/2010 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 10/19/2010, Entered: 10/26/2010 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 10/19/2010, Entered: 10/26/2010 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: 10/26/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: 10/26/2010 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: 10/26/2010 Initial Disclosures
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 10/25/2010, Entered: 10/25/2010 Order
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 10/22/2010, Entered: 10/22/2010 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 10/22/2010, Entered: 10/22/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 10/22/2010, Entered: 10/22/2010 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 10/21/2010, Entered: 10/21/2010 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 10/21/2010, Entered: 10/21/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 10/21/2010, Entered: 10/21/2010 Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 10/20/2010, Entered: 10/20/2010 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 10/20/2010, Entered: 10/20/2010 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 10/20/2010, Entered: 10/20/2010 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 10/20/2010, Entered: 10/20/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 10/19/2010, Entered: 10/19/2010 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 10/19/2010, Entered: 10/19/2010 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 10/19/2010, Entered: 10/19/2010 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/19/2010 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/19/2010 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/19/2010 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 10/19/2010, Entered: 10/19/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 10/18/2010, Entered: 10/18/2010 Extension of Time to File Answer RE: Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Corporate Disclosure Statement by SunTrust Mortgage, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent SunTrust Bank for SunTrust Mortgage, Inc. (Russell, Cristine) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss 28 Amended Complaint,,, by SunTrust Mortgage, Inc.. Responses due by 11/1/2010 (Russell, Cristine) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 91 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint; PMI Mortgage Insurance Company's response due 10/29/2010. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 10/15/2010. (ps1) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: 10/14/2010 Extension of Time to File Answer RE: Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer RE: Complaints re 28 Amended Complaint,,, by PMI Mortgage Insurance Company. (Hancock, Paul) (Entered: 10/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: 10/14/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re: 81 Response to Motion to Dismiss; the parties are reminded that 10/21/10 is the last day to amend pleadings. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 10/14/2010. (ps1) (Entered: 10/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: 10/13/2010 Order scheduling Mediation.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Scheduling Mediation with the Honorable Herbert Stettin; Mediation Hearing set for 7/12/2011 10:00 AM; Mediation report due by 7/15/2011. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 10/13/2010. (ps1) (Entered: 10/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: 10/13/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Ignacio Damian Figueroa of Filing Amended Propsed Mediation Order (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order on Mediation (Amended))(Trent, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: 10/13/2010 Notice of Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Hearing on 85 MOTION to Dismiss 28 Amended Complaint: Motion Hearing set for 11/9/2010 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. (ps1) (Entered: 10/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: 10/12/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Ignacio Damian Figueroa of Filing Proposed Mediation Order (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Trent, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: 10/12/2010 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss 28 Amended Complaint,,, ( Responses due by 10/29/2010), MOTION to Adopt/Join 60 MOTION to Dismiss 28 Amended Complaint,,,, 64 MOTION to Dismiss 28 Amended Complaint,,, MOTION to Dismiss 28 Amended Complaint,,,, 62 MOTION to Dismiss 28 Amended Complaint,,,, 38 MOTION to Dismiss 28 Amended Complaint,,, by HSBC Finance Corporation. (Joffe, Jason) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: 10/12/2010 Notice of Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Hearing on 80 MOTION to Dismiss 28 Amended Complaint, and Memorandum in Support Thereof: Motion Hearing set for 11/9/2010 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. (ps1) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: 10/12/2010 Notice of Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Hearing on 60 MOTION to Dismiss 28 Amended Complaint; 64 MOTION to Dismiss 28 Amended Complaint; 62 MOTION to Dismiss 28 Amended Complaint; and 65 MOTION to Dismiss 28 Amended Complaint, and Supporting Memorandum of Law: Motion Hearing set for 10/28/2010 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. (ps1) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: 10/12/2010 Notice of Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Hearing on 38 MOTION to Dismiss 28 Amended Complaint: Motion Hearing set for 10/22/2010 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. (ps1) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: 10/12/2010 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 38 MOTION to Dismiss 28 Amended Complaint,,, filed by Ignacio Damian Figueroa. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Part 1, # 2 Exhibit A Part 2, # 3 Exhibit A Part 3)(Trent, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 10/11/2010, Entered: 10/11/2010 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss 28 Amended Complaint,,, 21 Amended Complaint,,, and Memorandum in Support Thereof by Nationwide Advantage Mortgage Company. Responses due by 10/28/2010 (Bellido, Nelson) (Entered: 10/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 10/11/2010, Entered: 10/11/2010 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nationwide Advantage Mortgage Company identifying Other Affiliate Allied Group Inc., Other Affiliate AMCO Insurance Company, Other Affiliate ALLIED Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Depositors Insurance Company for Nationwide Advantage Mortgage Company (Bellido, Nelson) (Entered: 10/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: 10/5/2010 Certificate of Interested Party
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of Interested Party by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Subsidiary List for Wells Fargo & Co)(Winston, Michael) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: 10/5/2010 Summons Reissued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Summons Reissued as to Fannie Mae, United Guaranty Corporation. (ls) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: 10/5/2010 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant CRE Finance Council f/k/a Commercial Mortgage Securities Association by Ignacio Damian Figueroa (Trent, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/4/2010, Entered: 10/4/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Keith Winston on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Winston, Michael) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/4/2010, Entered: 10/4/2010 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Clerks Notice to Filer re 62 MOTION to Dismiss 28 Amended Complaint,,,. Two or More Document Events Filed as One; ERROR - Only one event was selected by the Filer but more than one event was applicable to the document filed. The docket entry was corrected by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but in the future, the Filer must select all applicable events. (ls) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: 10/4/2010 Notice of Adoption
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Adoption/Joinder by Citimortgage Inc. Related document: 38 MOTION to Dismiss 28 Amended Complaint,,, filed by Law Offices of David J. Stern, P.A., David J. Stern (ls)(See Image at DE # 62 ) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/4/2010, Entered: 10/4/2010 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 55 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga (CMA) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/4/2010, Entered: 10/4/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 59 Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint; MGIC Investor Services' response due 11/1/2010. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 10/4/2010. (ps1) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/4/2010, Entered: 10/4/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 53 Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to the Second Amended Complaint; Bank of America, N.A.'s response due 11/1/2010. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 10/4/2010. (ps1) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/4/2010, Entered: 10/4/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 52 Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to the Second Amended Complaint; Merrill Lynch Credit Corporation's response due 11/1/2010. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 10/4/2010. (ps1) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/4/2010, Entered: 10/4/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Merrill Lynch Credit Corporation re 52 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer RE: Complaints re 28 Amended Complaint,,, of Withdrawal of Appearance and Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to the Second Amended Complaint (Fracasso, Robert) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/4/2010, Entered: 10/4/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Bank of America, N.A. re 53 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer RE: Complaints re 28 Amended Complaint,,, of Withdrawal of Appearance and Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to the Second Amended Complaint (Fracasso, Robert) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: 10/1/2010 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Corporate Disclosure Statement by JP Morgan Chase & Co. (McClaskey, Michelle) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: 10/1/2010 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss 28 Amended Complaint,,, and Supporting Memorandum of Law by JP Morgan Chase & Co.. Responses due by 10/18/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(McClaskey, Michelle) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: 10/1/2010 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss 28 Amended Complaint,,, by Bank of America, N.A., Merrill Lynch Credit Corporation, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Responses due by 10/18/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law in Support)(Gonzalez, Juan) Modified on 10/4/2010 (ls). (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: 10/1/2010 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Corporate Disclosure Statement by Citimortgage Inc. (Ursini, Louis) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: 10/1/2010 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss 28 Amended Complaint,,, by Citimortgage Inc.. Responses due by 10/18/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Ursini, Louis) Modified to add missing event 73 Notice of Joinder on 10/4/2010 (ls). (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: 10/1/2010 Certificate of Interested Party
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of Interested Party by MGIC Investor Services (Attachments: # 1 Certification)(McGuinness, Lynette) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: 10/1/2010 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss 28 Amended Complaint,,, by Merscorp, Inc.. Responses due by 10/18/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Brochin, Robert) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: 10/1/2010 Extension of Time to File Answer RE: Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer RE: Complaints re 28 Amended Complaint,,, by MGIC Investor Services. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certification)(McGuinness, Lynette) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: 9/30/2010 Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statement of: Civil RICO Case as to Count 3 by Ignacio Damian Figueroa (Trent, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: 9/30/2010 Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statement of: Civil RICO Case as to Count 2 by Ignacio Damian Figueroa (Trent, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: 9/30/2010 Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statement of: Civil RICO Case (Count 1) by Ignacio Damian Figueroa (Trent, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: 9/30/2010 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Danielle Szukala. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 7361. (ksa) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: 9/30/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Juan Aedo Gonzalez on behalf of Merrill Lynch Credit Corporation (Gonzalez, Juan) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: 9/30/2010 Extension of Time to File Answer RE: Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer RE: Complaints re 28 Amended Complaint,,, by Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fracasso, Robert) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: 9/30/2010 Extension of Time to File Answer RE: Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer RE: Complaints re 28 Amended Complaint,,, by Merrill Lynch Credit Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fracasso, Robert) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: 9/30/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 48 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint; HSBC Finance Corporation's response due 10/12/2010. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/29/2010. (ps1) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: 9/30/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 44 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint; Merscorp, Inc.'s response due 10/1/2010. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/29/2010. (ps1) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: 9/30/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response-ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 45 Motion for Extension of Time; Defendant, EverHome Mortgage has until 10/20/10 to file a response to the Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/29/2010. (ps1) (Entered: 09/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: 9/29/2010 Extension of Time to File Answer RE: Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer RE: Complaints re 28 Amended Complaint,,, by HSBC Finance Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rollins, Traci) (Entered: 09/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: 9/29/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Juan Aedo Gonzalez on behalf of Bank of America, N.A. (Gonzalez, Juan) (Entered: 09/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: 9/29/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response-ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 43 Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint; response due by 10/11/10. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/29/2010. (ps1) (Entered: 09/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: 9/29/2010 Extension of Time to File Answer RE: Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendant Everhome's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 28 Amended Complaint by Everhome Mortgage Company. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Heller, William) Modified to reflect correct event type (Extension of Time to File Answer Re: Complaints) and modified text on 9/30/2010 (ral). (Entered: 09/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: 9/29/2010 Extension of Time to File Answer RE: Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer RE: Complaints re 28 Amended Complaint,,, by Merscorp, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brochin, Robert) (Entered: 09/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: 9/29/2010 Extension of Time to File Answer RE: Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Defendant Nationwide Advantage Mortgage Company's Unopposed MOTION for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's 21 Second Amended Complaint by Nationwide Advantage Mortgage Company. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order )(Bellido, Nelson) Modified to reflect correct event type (Extension of Time to File Answer Re: Complaints) and modified text on 9/30/2010 (ral). (Entered: 09/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: 9/29/2010 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dennis Michael Campbell on behalf of JP Morgan Chase & Co. (Campbell, Dennis) (Entered: 09/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/28/2010, Entered: 9/28/2010 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Clerks Notice to Filer re 40 Corporate Disclosure Statement. Attorney Did Not Associate Themselves; ERROR - Filing attorney neglected to associate themselves to the case. The Clerk has added the attorney to the case. It is not necessary to refile this document future filings must comply with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures and Local Rules by filing a Notice of Attorney Appearance and linking themselves to the case. (ral) (Entered: 09/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: 9/27/2010 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Corporate Disclosure Statement by HSBC Finance Corporation identifying Corporate Parent HSBC Holdings plc, Other Affiliate Household International, Inc., Other Affiliate Household Finance Corporation for HSBC Finance Corporation (Joffe, Jason) (Entered: 09/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/23/2010, Entered: 9/23/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER on Discovery - [see order for full details]. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Stephen T. Brown on 9/23/2010. (dt) (Entered: 09/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: 9/22/2010 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss 28 Amended Complaint,,, by Law Offices of David J. Stern, P.A., David J. Stern. Responses due by 10/12/2010 (Tew, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: 9/21/2010 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Setting Trial and Pre-Trial Schedule, Requiring Mediation, and Referring Certain Motions to Ch. Magistrate Judge Stephen T. Brown: Jury Trial set for 2 week trial period beginning 10/24/2011 before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Calendar Call set for 10/18/2010 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Motions to amend pleadings or join parties due by 10/21/2010. All discovery to be completed by 7/1/2011. Motion for class certification due by 12/21/2010. In Limine Motions due by 9/12/2011. All pre-trial motions due by 7/25/2011. Pretrial Stipulation due by 9/12/2011. Hearing on Motion for class certification set for 2/25/2011 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Deadline for completing class certification discovery set for 12/7/10. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/21/2010. (ps1) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: 9/20/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Law Offices of David J. Stern, P.A., David J. Stern re 34 SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f)/16.1 of Filing Defendants' Proposed Scheduling Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Scheduling Order)(Tew, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: 9/20/2010 Certificate of Interested Party
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of Interested Party by Merscorp, Inc. (Boese, Andrew) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: 9/20/2010 SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f)/16.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Ignacio Damian Figueroa, Law Offices of David J. Stern, P.A., Merscorp, Inc., David J. Stern (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Submitted by Plaintiff - Defendants to Submit Their Own)(Trent, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: 9/20/2010 Certificate of Interested Party
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of Interested Party by Ignacio Damian Figueroa (Trent, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 32 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: 9/20/2010 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Corporate Disclosure Statement by David J. Stern, Law Offices of David J. Stern, P.A. (Tew, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/17/2010, Entered: 9/17/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying 30 Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/17/2010. (ps1) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/17/2010, Entered: 9/17/2010 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Scheduling Report by Ignacio Damian Figueroa. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Trent, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/16/2010, Entered: 9/16/2010 Order to Show Cause Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order requiring Plaintiff to file his RICO Case Statement by 9/30/2010. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/16/2010. (ps1) (Entered: 09/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/9/2010, Entered: 9/9/2010 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against American Land Title Association, Bank of America Bank, N.A., CCO Mortgage Corporation, CRE Finance Council, Chase Home Mortgage Corporation, Citimortgage Inc., Corinthian Mortgage Corporation, DJSP Enterprises, Inc., Everhome Mortgage Company, Fannie Mae, First American Title Insurance Company, Freddie Mac, GMAC Residential Funding Corporation, Guaranty Bank, HSBC Finance Corporation, JP Morgan Chase & Co., Law Offices of David J. Stern, P.A., MGIC Investor Services, Merrill Lynch Credit Corporation, Merscorp, Inc., Mortgage Bankers Association, Nationwide Advantage Mortgage Company, PMI Mortgage Insurance Company, David J. Stern, Stewart Title Guaranty Company, SunTrust Mortgage, Inc., United Guaranty Corporation, WMC Mortgage Corp., WMC Mortgage Corporation, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by Ignacio Damian Figueroa. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A for H)(Trent, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/9/2010, Entered: 9/9/2010 Order on Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 26 Motion for Leave to Amend. Clerks Notice: Filer must separately re-file the amended pleading pursuant to Local Rule 15.1, unless otherwise ordered by the Judge; Plaintiff is to file his second amended complaint by 9/13/10. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/9/2010. (ps1) (Entered: 09/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/8/2010, Entered: 9/8/2010 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Ignacio Damian Figueroa. Responses due by 9/27/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A through H, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Trent, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: 9/7/2010 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Summons Issued as to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (ral) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: 9/7/2010 Order StrikingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER STRIKING 21 Second Amended Complaint filed by Ignacio Damian Figueroa. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/7/2010. (ps1) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: 9/7/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response-ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 20 Motion for 20-Day Extension of Time to Respond to the Amended Complaint; response due by 9/29/10. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/7/2010. (ps1) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: 9/7/2010 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed into CM/ECF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Entry of Parties Listed (Trent, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/5/2010, Entered: 9/5/2010 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against American Land Title Association, Bank of America Bank, N.A., CCO Mortgage Corporation, CRE Finance Council, Chase Home Mortgage Corporation, Citimortgage Inc., Corinthian Mortgage Corporation, DJSP Enterprises, Inc., Everhome Mortgage Company, Fannie Mae, First American Title Insurance Company, Freddie Mac, GMAC Residential Funding Corporation, Guaranty Bank, HSBC Finance Corporation, JP Morgan Chase & Co., Law Offices of David J. Stern, P.A., MGIC Investor Services, Merrill Lynch Credit Corporation, Merscorp, Inc., Mortgage Bankers Association, Nationwide Advantage Mortgage Company, PMI Mortgage Insurance Company, David J. Stern, Stewart Title Guaranty Company, SunTrust Mortgage, Inc., United Guaranty Corporation, filed by Ignacio Damian Figueroa. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A through H)(Trent, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: 9/3/2010 Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 11 Amended Complaint by Merscorp, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Boese, Andrew) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: 9/3/2010 Notice of Pendency of Other Action
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Pendency of Other Action by Merscorp, Inc. (Boese, Andrew) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/30/2010, Entered: 8/30/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER requiring service to be perfected by 11/27/10. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/30/2010. (ps1) (Entered: 08/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/26/2010, Entered: 8/27/2010 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Summons Issued as to Bank of America Bank, N.A., CRE Finance Council, Citimortgage Inc., Everhome Mortgage Company, JP Morgan Chase & Co.. (ail) (Entered: 08/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/26/2010, Entered: 8/27/2010 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Summons Issued as to Chase Home Mortgage Corporation, Freddie Mac, PMI Mortgage Insurance Company, United Guaranty Corporation. (ail) (Entered: 08/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/26/2010, Entered: 8/27/2010 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Summons Issued as to Corinthian Mortgage Corporation, MGIC Investor Services, Mortgage Bankers Association, Stewart Title Guaranty Company, SunTrust Mortgage, Inc.. (ail) (Entered: 08/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/26/2010, Entered: 8/27/2010 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Summons Issued as to Fannie Mae, First American Title Insurance Company, HSBC Finance Corporation, Merrill Lynch Credit Corporation, Nationwide Advantage Mortgage Company. (ail) (Entered: 08/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/27/2010, Entered: 8/27/2010 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed into CM/ECF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Entry of Parties Listed (Trent, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/24/2010, Entered: 8/26/2010 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Clerks Notice to Filer re 11 Amended Complaint. Parties Not Added; ERROR - The Filer failed to add all parties indicated in [de#11]. Filer is instructed to add the additional parties by filing a Notice of Entry of Parties. (ail) (Entered: 08/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/24/2010, Entered: 8/24/2010 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT against Law Offices of David J. Stern, P.A., Merscorp, Inc., David J. Stern, filed by Ignacio Damian Figueroa. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A through H)(Trent, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: 8/23/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response-ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to Plaintiff's Complaint; response due by 9/14/10. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/23/2010. (ps1) (Entered: 08/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: 8/20/2010 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Corporate Disclosure Statement by Law Offices of David J. Stern, P.A. (Tew, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: 8/20/2010 Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 1 Complaint, by Law Offices of David J. Stern, P.A., David J. Stern. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Tew, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: 8/19/2010 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling ReportCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties to be filed by by 9/20/2010. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/19/2010. (ps1) (Entered: 08/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: 8/19/2010 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response-ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 4 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint; Merscorp, Inc. has until 9/9/10 to respond. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/19/2010. (ps1) (Entered: 08/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/18/2010, Entered: 8/18/2010 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Corporate Disclosure Statement by Merscorp, Inc. (Brochin, Robert) (Entered: 08/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/18/2010, Entered: 8/18/2010 Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 1 Complaint, by Merscorp, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brochin, Robert) (Entered: 08/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: 7/26/2010 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Summons Issued as to Law Offices of David J. Stern, P.A., Merscorp, Inc., David J. Stern. (jc) (Entered: 07/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: 7/26/2010 Judge Assignment RE: Electronic ComplaintCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Assignment RE: Electronic Complaint to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga (jc) (Entered: 07/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: 7/26/2010 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT against Law Offices of David J. Stern, P.A., MERSCORP, INC., David J. Stern. Filing fee $ 350.00 receipt number 113C-3040156, filed by Ignacio Damian Figueroa. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits, # 2 Summon(s) 3 Summons, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Trent, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 212 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?