Allcare Dental Management, LLC et al v. Zrinyi et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Idaho District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-00407
District Judge B. Lynn Winmill, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge B. Lynn Winmill
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Allcare Dental Management, LLC, Plaintiff

Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Allcare Dental Management, LLC

Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/11/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Guy Hallam, Jr. +1 208 288 1888 +1 866 821 9543 tgh@khsidaholaw.com
TERMINATED: 12/11/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Robert Kormanik +1 208 288 1888 +1 866 821 9543 jrk@khsidaholaw.com
No Logo Christopher Beck, Plaintiff

Represented by Kormanik Hallam & Sneed LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/11/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Guy Hallam, Jr. +1 208 288 1888 +1 866 821 9543 tgh@khsidaholaw.com
TERMINATED: 12/11/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Robert Kormanik +1 208 288 1888 +1 866 821 9543 jrk@khsidaholaw.com
No Logo David Pennington, Plaintiff

Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Pennington

Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/11/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Guy Hallam, Jr. +1 208 288 1888 +1 866 821 9543 tgh@khsidaholaw.com
TERMINATED: 12/11/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Robert Kormanik +1 208 288 1888 +1 866 821 9543 jrk@khsidaholaw.com
v.
No Logo Edward Greene, Defendant

Represented by Givens Pursley LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amber N. Dina +1 208 388 1200 amberdina@givenspursley.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Debora Kathleen Kristensen +1 208 388 1200 dkk@givenspursley.com
No Logo Tera Zrinyi, Defendant

Represented by GIVENS PURSLEY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amber N. Dina +1 208 388 1200 amberdina@givenspursley.com

Represented by Givens Pursley LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Debora Kathleen Kristensen +1 208 388 1200 dkk@givenspursley.com
No Logo TNKK, LLC, Defendant

Represented by Givens Pursley LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amber N. Dina +1 208 388 1200 amberdina@givenspursley.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Debora Kathleen Kristensen +1 208 388 1200 dkk@givenspursley.com
Attributes
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
Timeline
  Entries (102) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 12/30/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
JUDGMENT This case is dismissed with prejudice, with each side bearing its own costs and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by jm) (Entered: 12/31/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 12/30/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE with Prejudice re: 100 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Edward Greene, TNKK, LLC, Tera Zrinyi. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by jm) (Entered: 12/31/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 12/30/2009, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Edward Greene, TNKK, LLC, Tera Zrinyi. (Kristensen, Debora)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 12/21/2009, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE by Defendants Edward Greene, TNKK, LLC, Tera Zrinyi re 86 Order,. (Kristensen, Debora)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 12/16/2009, Entered: None
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript (jm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 12/16/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
Transcript of Proceedings held on 9/4/09 before Judge Candy W. Dale. ESR Vicki Jones, Telephone number Canyon Transcription (208) 454-1010. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. This transcript is not available to the general public and as such is sealed. Redaction Request due 1/11/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/19/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/19/2010.(jm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by John R. Kormanik re 95 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, filed by Allcare Dental Management, LLC, Christopher Beck, David Pennington. (Kormanik, John) Modified on 12/14/2009 to edit text (jm).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 94 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Thomas Guy Hallam, Jr and John Robert Kormanik terminated. The hearing on pending motions scheduled for 12/21/09 at 3:30 PM is vacated. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by jm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 12/9/2009, Entered: None
MOTION for leave to Withdraw as Counsel and Vacate Hearing on Motions for Summary Judgment. John Robert Kormanik appearing for Plaintiffs Allcare Dental Management, LLC, Christopher Beck, David Pennington. Responses due by 1/4/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit in Support of Motion)(Kormanik, John) Modified on 12/10/2009 to edit text (jm).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 12/8/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER - Pending before the Court is the Stipulation 92 of the parties to Dismiss Plaintiff Christopher Beck. The Court having considered the pleadings shall approve the Stipulation. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that Plaintiff Christopher Beck's causes of action are dismissed with prejudice, and without costs or attorney's fees awarded to any parties.Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (sbh)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 12/4/2009, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Christopher Beck. (Hallam, Thomas)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 91 Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: None
SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 74 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial) filed by Allcare Dental Management, LLC, Christopher Beck, David Pennington.(Kormanik, John)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 11/25/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE by Edward Greene, TNKK, LLC, Tera Zrinyi re 89 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion (Kristensen, Debora)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 89 Filed: 11/25/2009, Entered: None
SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 77 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Edward Greene, TNKK, LLC, Tera Zrinyi. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Amber Dina, # 2 Affidavit of Melissa May)(Kristensen, Debora)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 11/25/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE by Allcare Dental Management, LLC, Christopher Beck, David Pennington re 87 Sealed Document (Kormanik, John)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 87 Filed: 11/25/2009, Entered: None
Sealed Document Re: 74 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial) Plaintiff's Reply Brief. (Kormanik, John)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 11/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
FINAL ORDER RE: SANCTIONS. Sanctions will be imposed upon Plaintiffs" Counsel and Plaintiff Allcare, jointly and severally, in the amount of $7,000.00. Signed by Judge Candy W Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by jm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 11/9/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE by Allcare Dental Management, LLC, Christopher Beck, David Pennington re 84 Sealed Response to Motion, 83 Sealed Response to Motion (Kormanik, John)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 84 Filed: 11/9/2009, Entered: None
SEALED AFFIDAVIT re 77 MOTION for Summary Judgment Affidavit filed by Allcare Dental Management, LLC, Christopher Beck, David Pennington. Replies due by 11/27/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Kormanik, John) Modified on 11/12/2009 to edit text (jm).
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 83 Filed: 11/9/2009, Entered: None
SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 77 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Allcare Dental Management, LLC, Christopher Beck, David Pennington. Replies due by 11/27/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement)(Kormanik, John)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 11/9/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE by Edward Greene, TNKK, LLC, Tera Zrinyi re 46 Order, Protective Order,, Notice of Service of Sealed Document (Kristensen, Debora)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 81 Filed: 11/9/2009, Entered: None
SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 74 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial) filed by Edward Greene, TNKK, LLC, Tera Zrinyi. Replies due by 11/27/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts which are in Dispute)(Kristensen, Debora)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 10/20/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 74 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial), and 77 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 12/21/2009 03:30 PM in Boise, ID before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (jlg)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 10/15/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE by Edward Greene, TNKK, LLC, Tera Zrinyi re 78 Sealed Document,, (Kristensen, Debora)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 78 Filed: 10/15/2009, Entered: None
Sealed Document Re: 77 MOTION for Summary Judgment Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Material Facts, # 2 Affidavit of Amber N. Dina, # 3 Exhibit 1 to Affidavit of Amber N. Dina, # 4 Exhibit 2 to Affidavit of Amber N. Dina, # 5 Exhibit 3 to Affidavit of Amber N. Dina, # 6 Exhibit 4 to Affidavit of Amber N. Dina, # 7 Exhibit 5 to Affidavit of Amber N. Dina, # 8 Exhibit 6 to Affidavit of Amber N. Dina, # 9 Exhibit 7 to Affidavit of Amber N. Dina)(Kristensen, Debora)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/15/2009, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
MOTION for Summary Judgment Debora K Kristensen appearing for Defendants Edward Greene, TNKK, LLC, Tera Zrinyi. Responses due by 11/9/2009 (Kristensen, Debora)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/15/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE by Allcare Dental Management, LLC, Christopher Beck, David Pennington re 75 Sealed Document (Kormanik, John)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 75 Filed: 10/15/2009, Entered: None
Sealed Document Re: 74 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial) Memorandum In Support. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Undisputed Facts - Filed Under Seal, # 2 Affidavit of T. Guy Hallam, Jr. - Filed Under Seal)(Kormanik, John)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/15/2009, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial) John Robert Kormanik appearing for Plaintiffs Allcare Dental Management, LLC, Christopher Beck, David Pennington. Responses due by 11/9/2009 (Kormanik, John)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/13/2009, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Debora K. Kristensen re 72 Order, filed by Edward Greene, TNKK, LLC, Tera Zrinyi. (Kristensen, Debora)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Granting the remaining component of Defendants' Motion seeking the imposition of sanctions. re 58 Defendants are directed to file an affidavit of attorney fees indicating the time spent in connection with the motion for contempt and the retrieval of the protected items on or before 10/19/09, for the Court's review. Signed by Judge Candy W Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by jm) (Entered: 10/06/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/17/2009, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of John R. Kormanik re 69 Motion Hearing, filed by Allcare Dental Management, LLC, David Pennington, Christopher Beck. (Kormanik, John)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 9/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER re 69 Motion Hearing: Pursuant to the Order of the Court as expressed in the Minutes, (Docket No. 69), Counsels' affidavits and the affidavits obtained from the individuals in possession of the disclosed confidential material shall be filed with the Court on or before September 18, 2009. The Court does not require that any copies of the confidential information retrieved be attached to any affidavit filed. Signed by Judge Candy W Dale. (klw)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 9/4/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Candy W Dale: Motion Hearing held on 9/4/2009 re 58 Expedited MOTION Motion for Contempt of Court Order re 46 Order, Protective Order,, filed by Edward Greene, TNKK, LLC, Tera Zrinyi. (Court Reporter/ESR VJones.) (td)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/28/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
AMENDED DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: 58 Expedited MOTION Motion for Contempt of Court Order re 46 Protective Order - Motion Hearing set for 9/4/2009 01:30 PM in Boise, ID before Judge Candy W Dale. Notice amended to reflect correct hearing date of 9/4/2009. (ah)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/28/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: 58 Expedited MOTION Motion for Contempt of Court Order re 46 Protective Order - Motion Hearing set for 8/4/2009 01:30 PM in Boise, ID before Judge Candy W Dale. (ah)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 66 Filed: 8/27/2009, Entered: None
SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 58 Expedited MOTION Motion for Contempt of Court Order re 46 Order, Protective Order,, filed by Tera Zrinyi, Edward Greene, TNKK, LLC.(Dina, Amber)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/26/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER - Pending before the Court is the Motion for Contempt of Court 58 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT this matter shall be referred to Judge Candy Wagahoff Dale. Plaintiff shall immediately contact Amy Hickox, Judge Dale's In-Court Deputy at (208) 334-9387 to schedule a hearing on the Motion for Contempt. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (sbh)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 64 Filed: 8/26/2009, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT OF DEBORA K. KRISTENSEN (SEALED) 58 Expedited MOTION for Contempt of Court Order re 46 Protective Order, 60 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, Affidavit of Debora K. Kristensen Amber Nicole Dina appearing for Defendants Tera Zrinyi, Edward Greene, TNKK, LLC. Responses due by 9/21/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Defendants' Reply to Plaintffs' Opposition to Motion for Contempt of Court Order)(Dina, Amber) Modified on 8/27/2009 to seal and edit text (jm).
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/26/2009, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Amber N. Dina in Support of Defendants' Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion for Contempt of Court Order re 58 Expedited MOTION Motion for Contempt of Court Order re 46 Order, Protective Order,, filed by Tera Zrinyi, Edward Greene, TNKK, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Debora K. Kristensen in Support of Defendants' Reply to Plaintifs' Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion for Contempt of Court Order)(Dina, Amber)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/25/2009, Entered: None
STIPULATION re 31 Scheduling Order, Modify Case Management Order by Tera Zrinyi, Edward Greene, TNKK, LLC. (Dina, Amber)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 61 Filed: 8/24/2009, Entered: None
Sealed Document Re: 60 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, Exhibit 3 to Affidavit of John R. Kormanik. (Kormanik, John)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/24/2009, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 58 Expedited MOTION Motion for Contempt of Court Order re 46 Order, Protective Order,, filed by Allcare Dental Management, LLC, David Pennington, Christopher Beck. Replies due by 9/11/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of John R. Kormanik, # 2 Affidavit of David Pennington, # 3 Affidavit of James P. Harrington)(Kormanik, John)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/19/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET ENTRY Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Larry M. Boyle: Settlement Conference held on 8/19/2009. Settlement agreement not reached. (Court Reporter/ESR Not Recorded.) (so)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/17/2009, Entered: None, Terminated: 10/5/2009
Expedited MOTION Motion for Contempt of Court Order re 46 Order, Protective Order,, Amber Nicole Dina appearing for Defendants Tera Zrinyi, Edward Greene, TNKK, LLC. Responses due by 9/10/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Contempt of Court Order, # 2 Affidavit of Edward Green in Support of Motion for Contempt of Court Order, # 3 Affidavit of Melissa A. Cavagnaro)(Dina, Amber)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/8/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER - Pending before the Court is the Stipulation 55 of the parties to amend the Case Management Order 31 . The Court having considered the pleadings shall approve the Stipulation. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED as follows: (1) Plaintiff shall disclose the experts intended to be called at trial on or before August 18, 2009; (2) Defendant shall disclose the experts intended to be called at trial on or before September 18, 2009; and (3) Rebuttal experts shall be disclosed by September 25, 2009. Additionally, the Settlement Conference 52 currently set on August 19, 2009 at 9:30 a.m. in Boise, Idaho, with The Honorable Larry M. Boyle shall remain as scheduled. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (sbh)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/8/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER - Pending before the Court is the Stipulation 54 of the parties' Re Review of Computer Evidence. The Court having considered the pleadings shall approve the Stipulation. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT (1) The Stipulation shall govern the forensic expert review of the computer hard drive images of Defendants' desktop and laptop computers created by Plaintiffs' expert on November 1, 2008 (the "Computer Evidence"); (2) The parties agree that the Computer Evidence was sealed in a box and has been in Givens Pursley LLP's safekeeping since November 1, 2008; (3) The parties agree to coordinate a reasonable timeline for Plaintiffs' computer expert to assess and review the Computer Evidence; (4) Plaintiffs' expert will employ procedures to ensure no changes are made to the Computer Evidence through the review process; (5) Plaintiffs' attorneys and expert may search the Computer Evidence for files and documents reasonably calculated to lead to the discovery of admissible evidence. To the extent technologically possible, the searches should be limited in time and scope to those files and documents relevant to the September 4, 2008 internet posting at issue in this action, and shall not include any searches for, or review of, Defendants' Confidential Material, including but not limited to, Defendants' business plans and HIPPA protected patient files; (6) Upon conclusion of Plaintiffs' attorneys and expert's review of the Computer Evidence, the Computer Evidence shall be returned, in a sealed box, to Givens Pursley for safekeeping; and (7) Plaintiffs' attorneys shall produce to Defendants any documents evidencing any meta data and information about the Computer Evidence that they believe they might use at any deposition, hearing, settlement conference or trial in this action as required by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Court's Rule 16 Scheduling Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the Protective Order dated May 6, 2009 46 shall govern the designation, disclosure, and use of any Confidential Material produced by the parties. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (sbh)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/7/2009, Entered: None
STIPULATION re 31 Scheduling Order, by Tera Zrinyi, Edward Greene, John or Jane Does I-V, TNKK, LLC, Allcare Dental Management, LLC, David Pennington, Christopher Beck. (Hallam, Thomas)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/6/2009, Entered: None
STIPULATION Re Review of Computer of Computer Evidence by Tera Zrinyi, Edward Greene. (Dina, Amber)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/10/2009, Entered: None
STIPULATION re 31 Scheduling Order, by Allcare Dental Management, LLC, David Pennington, Christopher Beck. (Kormanik, John)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/8/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER re 51 Order Setting Settlement Conference: The Order Setting the Settlement Conference for August 20, 2009, is AMENDED. The Settlement Conference shall take place on August 19, 2009, at 9:30 AM. All other aspects of the Order 51 remain the same. ( Settlement Conference set for 8/19/2009 09:30 AM in Boise, ID before Judge Larry M. Boyle.). Signed by Judge Larry M. Boyle. (bk)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/23/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ( Settlement Conference set for 8/20/2009 09:30 AM in Boise, ID before Judge Larry M. Boyle.). Signed by Judge Larry M. Boyle. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by jm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER - The parties have agreed to a Settlement Conference to be conducted by United States Magistrate Judge Larry M. Boyle, United States District Court for the District of Idaho. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT this matter shall be referred to Judge Boyle for the purposes of conducting a Settlement Conference. Local Rule 16.4. Plaintiff shall contact Merritt Dublin, the Judge's Law Clerk, at (208) 334-1360 no later than ten days from the date of this order to schedule the Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (sbh)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/15/2009, Entered: None
Defendants ANSWER to 47 Amended Complaint (Second) by Tera Zrinyi, Edward Greene, TNKK, LLC.(Dina, Amber)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 48 Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: None
Sealed Document Re: 47 Amended Complaint. (Kormanik, John)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: None
AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by Allcare Dental Management, LLC, David Pennington, Christopher Beck.(Kormanik, John)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/6/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
PROTECTIVE ORDER re 44 Stipulation filed by Edward Greene, Christopher Beck, David Pennington, Tera Zrinyi, Allcare Dental Management, LLC, John or Jane Does I-V. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by jm) (Entered: 05/07/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/6/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER - Pending before the Court is the unopposed Motion 42 for Leave to File on Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial. Defendants have filed a Non-Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion 43 . The Court having considered the pleadings shall grant the motion. IT IS ORDERED THAT the Second Amended Complaint is hereby ordered filed. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill.(caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by sbh)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/1/2009, Entered: None
STIPULATION Stipulated Protective Order by Tera Zrinyi, Edward Greene, John or Jane Does I-V, Allcare Dental Management, LLC, David Pennington, Christopher Beck. (Dina, Amber)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/24/2009, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion re 42 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint Non-Opposition to Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Tera Zrinyi, Edward Greene. Replies due by 5/11/2009.(Dina, Amber)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint John Robert Kormanik appearing for Plaintiffs Allcare Dental Management, LLC, David Pennington, Christopher Beck. Responses due by 4/27/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Affidavit of John R. Kormanik)(Kormanik, John)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Tera Zrinyi, Edward Greene, Allcare Dental Management, LLC, David Pennington, Christopher Beck re 28 Amended Complaint, 40 Answer to Amended Complaint Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 4/21/2009. (jm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/12/2009, Entered: None
ANSWER to 28 Amended Complaint by Tera Zrinyi, Edward Greene.(Kristensen, Debora)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/4/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Granting 32 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Edward Greene, Tera Zrinyi. Plaintiffs' claims related to the "EEOC filing statement" are dismissed. Claims related to the internet postings remain. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by jm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/3/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge B. Lynn Winmill: Motion Hearing held on 2/3/2009 re 32 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Edward Greene, Tera Zrinyi. Matter deemed UNDER ADVISEMENT. (Court Reporter Roxanne Patchell.) (lg)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 32 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Tera Zrinyi, Edward Greene.(Kristensen, Debora)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/5/2009, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 32 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Allcare Dental Management, LLC, David Pennington, Christopher Beck. Replies due by 1/23/2009.(Kormanik, John)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/16/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 32 MOTION to Dismiss : Motion Hearing set for 2/3/2009 08:00 AM in Boise, ID before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (lg)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 34 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: None
Sealed Document Re: 32 MOTION to Dismiss. (Kristensen, Debora)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Tera Zrinyi, DDS re 32 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Tera Zrinyi, Edward Greene refiled to attach correct signature page. (Kristensen, Debora)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
MOTION to Dismiss Debora K Kristensen appearing for Defendants Tera Zrinyi, Edward Greene. Responses due by 1/8/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Tera Zrinyi, DDS in Support of Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Kristensen, Debora)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/9/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Amended Pleadings due by 4/9/2009. Joinder of Parties due by 4/9/2009. ADR Plan to be filed by 4/9/2009. Discovery due by 9/17/2009. Dispositive Motions due by 10/15/2009. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by jm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER - The Court finds the Motion 4 for a More Definite Statement to be moot due to the filing of the Stipulation 22 filed in this matter. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by sbh)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 29 Filed: 12/3/2008, Entered: None
Sealed Document Re: 28 Amended Complaint. (Kormanik, John)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/3/2008, Entered: None
AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by Allcare Dental Management, LLC, David Pennington, Christopher Beck.(Kormanik, John)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/3/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER - The Court hereby clarifies the Stipulation 23 and Motion to Seal 17 . Only Exhibit 1 of the First Amended Complaint shall be sealed, and not the entire First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (sbh)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/3/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER - Pending before the Court is the Stipulation 23 of the parties to Seal the First Amended Complaint. The Court having considered the pleadings shall approve the Stipulation and GRANT the Motion to seal 17 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the First Amended Complaint shall be under seal. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (sbh)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/3/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER - Pending before the Court is the Stipulation 22 of the parties for leave to file a First Amended Complaint. The Court having considered the pleadings shall approve the Stipulation. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, attached as Exhibit 1 to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial 16 , shall be filed. Additionally, this Order shall in no way affect or be deemed a waiver of Defendants' ability to assert all defenses and objections to the claims made in Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, including Defendants' ability to bring a motion to dismiss all or a portion of such Complaint pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) and/or Rule 56. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (sbh)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/3/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER - Pending before the Court is the Stipulation 21 of the parties to Strike Portions of the Affidavits of Tera Zrinyi, DDS [5-4] and Edward Greene [5-5]. The Court having considered the pleadings shall approve the Stipulation. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: (1) The following paragraphs of the Affidavit of Tera Zrinyi, DDS, filed on or about October 24, 2008, as Docket Number 5-4, are stricken from the record in this matter: 10, 11, 14, 17, 18, 20, 21, 22, 23, 24, 25, 28 and 29; and (2) The following paragraphs of the Affidavit of Edward Greene, filed on or about October 24, 2008, as Docket Number 5-5, are stricken from the record in this matter: 9, 10, 11, 12, 13, 15, 17, 18, 19, 20 and 24. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (sbh)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/2/2008, Entered: None
STIPULATION re 17 First MOTION to Seal Document 16 First MOTION to Amend/Correct and for leave to file First Amended ComplaintFirst MOTION to Seal Document 16 First MOTION to Amend/Correct and for leave to file First Amended Complaint by Allcare Dental Management, LLC, David Pennington, Christopher Beck. (Kormanik, John)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/2/2008, Entered: None
STIPULATION re 16 First MOTION to Amend/Correct and for leave to file First Amended Complaint by Tera Zrinyi, Edward Greene. (Kristensen, Debora)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/2/2008, Entered: None
STIPULATION re 5 MOTION for Reconsideration Striking Portions of the Affidavits of Tera Zrinyi, DDS (Dkt 5-4) and Edward Greene (Dkt 5-5) by Allcare Dental Management, LLC, David Pennington, Christopher Beck. (Kormanik, John)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/1/2008, Entered: None
SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Allcare Dental Management, LLC, David Pennington, Christopher Beck. (Kormanik, John)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Modifying Court's October 20, 2008 Memorandum Decision and Order re 8 Stipulation filed by Edward Greene, Tera Zrinyi, 3 Memorandum Decision and Order. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by jm) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 18 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None
Sealed Document Re: 17 First MOTION to Seal Document 16 First MOTION to Amend/Correct and for leave to file First Amended ComplaintFirst MOTION to Seal Document 16 First MOTION to Amend/Correct and for leave to file First Amended Complaint. (Kormanik, John)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None
First MOTION to Seal Document 16 First MOTION to Amend/Correct and for leave to file First Amended Complaint John Robert Kormanik appearing for Plaintiffs Allcare Dental Management, LLC, David Pennington, Christopher Beck. Responses due by 12/11/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(Kormanik, John)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None
First MOTION to Amend/Correct and for leave to file First Amended Complaint John Robert Kormanik appearing for Plaintiffs Allcare Dental Management, LLC, David Pennington, Christopher Beck. Responses due by 12/11/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial without Exhbit 1)(Kormanik, John)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion re 4 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Allcare Dental Management, LLC, David Pennington, Christopher Beck. Replies due by 12/5/2008.(Kormanik, John)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/14/2008, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allcare Dental Management, LLC, David Pennington, Christopher Beck. Edward Greene served on 10/27/2008, answer due 11/17/2008. (Kormanik, John)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/14/2008, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allcare Dental Management, LLC, David Pennington, Christopher Beck. Tera Zrinyi served on 10/9/2008, answer due 10/29/2008. (Kormanik, John)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/14/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 12/9/2008 10:00 AM in Boise Chambers before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (Attachments: # 1 Litigation Plan Letter, # 2 Litigation Plan)(lg)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/11/2008, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Memorandum Decision and Order and Subpoena served on Cable One, Inc on October 21, 2008, filed by Allcare Dental Management, LLC, David Pennington, Christopher Beck. (Hallam, Thomas)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/11/2008, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons; Complaint; other documents served on Debora Kristensen - atty for Defendants on October 27, 2008, filed by Allcare Dental Management, LLC, David Pennington, Christopher Beck. (Hallam, Thomas)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/11/2008, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons; Complaint; other documents served on Tera Zrinyi on October 7, 2008, filed by Allcare Dental Management, LLC, David Pennington, Christopher Beck. (Hallam, Thomas)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/31/2008, Entered: None
STIPULATION re 3 Memorandum Decision, Order, Terminate Motions,,, by Tera Zrinyi, Edward Greene. (Kristensen, Debora)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/28/2008, Entered: None
JOINDER by Defendant Edward Greene joining 4 MOTION for More Definite Statement. (Kristensen, Debora)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/27/2008, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Steve Vlassek in support of Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration of Court's 10/20/08 Memorandum Decision and Order re 5 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Tera Zrinyi. (Kristensen, Debora) .
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: None
MOTION for Reconsideration Debora K Kristensen appearing for Defendant Tera Zrinyi. Responses due by 11/17/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Reconsideration, # 2 Affidavit of Debora K. Kristensen, # 3 Affidavit of Tera Zrinyi, DDS ISO Motion for Reconsideration, # 4 Affidavit of Ned Greene ISO Motion for Reconsideration)(Kristensen, Debora)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: None
MOTION for More Definite Statement Debora K Kristensen appearing for Defendant Tera Zrinyi. Responses due by 11/17/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support Motion for a More Definite Statement)(Kristensen, Debora)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER Granting 2 MOTION for Order to Allow Expedited Discovery filed by Christopher Beck, David Pennington, Allcare Dental Management, LLC.. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by jm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/7/2008, Entered: None
Expedited MOTION for Discovery Thomas Guy Hallam, Jr appearing for Plaintiffs Allcare Dental Management, LLC, David Pennington, Christopher Beck. Responses due by 10/31/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Affidavit of T. Guy Hallam in Support of Motion for Expedited Discovery, # 3 Affidavit of Andrew Knoll in Support of Motion for Expedited Discovery, # 4 Affidavit of Ian Creevy in Support of Motion for Expedited Discovery)(Hallam, Thomas)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/25/2008, Entered: None
COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against all plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 09760000000000395820.), filed by Allcare Dental Management, LLC, David Pennington, Christopher Beck. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(Kormanik, John)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 940 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?