Melaleuca, Inc. v. Organo Gold Int'l Inc. et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Idaho District Court, Case No. 4:10-cv-00420
District Judge Larry M. Boyle, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Larry M. Boyle
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Melaleuca Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Law Offices of Joshua K Chandler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael L. LaClare +1 208 522 0700 mlaclare@melaleuca.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan Douglas Nelson +1 208 522 0700 rnelson@melaleuca.com
v.
No Logo Organo Gold Int'l Inc., Defendant

Represented by ZARIAN MIDGLEY & JOHNSON PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher J Cuneo cuneo@zmjlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jamie Kay Parkinson +1 208 562 4912 parkinson@zmjlaw.com
No Logo Organo Gold International, LLC, Defendant

Represented by ZARIAN MIDGLEY & JOHNSON PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher J Cuneo cuneo@zmjlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jamie Kay Parkinson +1 208 562 4912 parkinson@zmjlaw.com
Attributes
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Timeline
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 76 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER. Plaintiffs Motion to Compel 58 is DENIED. Defendants request for an award for attorney fees is DENIED. Signed by Judge Larry M. Boyle. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by krb)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/21/2010, Entered: None
ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE(kb) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/21/2010, Entered: None
CONSENT filed. (kb) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Amended Pleadings due by 2/1/2011. Discovery due by 10/14/2011. Joinder of Parties due by 2/1/2011. Motions due by 3/16/2012. Mediation shall take place by 7/13/2011. Signed by Judge Larry M. Boyle. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by jm) (Entered: 10/18/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Larry M. Boyle: Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 10/13/2010. (Court Reporter/ESR Zach Springer.) (so) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET TEXT ORDER - Pursuant to Defendants' Withdrawal of Motion 17 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED denying as moot 7 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Larry M. Boyle. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by md)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None
ANSWER to 10 Amended Complaint by Organo Gold International, LLC.(Bond, Brook)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None
ANSWER to 10 Amended Complaint by Organo Gold Int'l Inc..(Bond, Brook)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None
WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT re: 7 MOTION to Dismiss First, Second, Third and Fifth Causes of Action of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Organo Gold International, LLC, Organo Gold Int'l Inc.. (Bond, Brook)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None
Statement of Supplemental Authority re 7 MOTION to Dismiss First, Second, Third and Fifth Causes of Action of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Melaleuca, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(LaClare, Michael)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None
SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Organo Gold Int'l Inc., Organo Gold International, LLC. (Bond, Brook)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Melaleuca, Inc. re 10 Amended Complaint (Nelson, Ryan)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J Cuneo on behalf of Organo Gold Int'l Inc., Organo Gold International, LLC (Cuneo, Christopher)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 7 MOTION to Dismiss First, Second, Third and Fifth Causes of Action of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Melaleuca, Inc.. Replies due by 10/7/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C, # 2 Exhibit D-E, # 3 Exhibit F-I, # 4 Exhibit J-L, # 5 Exhibit M)(Nelson, Ryan)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Melaleuca, Inc.. (Nelson, Ryan)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Holton Buggs, - Does 1-25, Does 26-50, Organo Gold Int'l Inc., Organo Gold International, LLC, filed by Melaleuca, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-3 to Amended Complaint)(Nelson, Ryan)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10/13/2010 10:30 AM in Boise Chambers before Judge Larry M. Boyle. Signed by Judge Larry M. Boyle. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by cjm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/30/2010, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Removal to Federal Court served on Melaleuca, Inc. on 8/23/2010, filed by Organo Gold Int'l Inc., Organo Gold International, LLC. (Bond, Brook)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/26/2010, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
MOTION to Dismiss First, Second, Third and Fifth Causes of Action of Plaintiff's Complaint Brook Bernard Bond appearing for Defendants Organo Gold Int'l Inc., Organo Gold International, LLC. Responses due by 9/20/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(Bond, Brook)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/24/2010, Entered: None
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Organo Gold Int'l Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Organo Gold Enterprise Inc. for Organo Gold Int'l Inc... (Bond, Brook)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/24/2010, Entered: None
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Organo Gold International, LLC. (Bond, Brook)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Organo Gold Int'l Inc., Organo Gold International, LLC re 1 Notice of Removal to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court (Bond, Brook)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None
SUPPLEMENT by Defendants Organo Gold Int'l Inc., Organo Gold International, LLC re 1 Notice of Removal State Docket Sheet. (Bond, Brook)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Melaleuca, Inc., Organo Gold Int'l Inc., Organo Gold International, LLC re 1 Notice of Removal. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 10/22/2010. (jm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE OF REMOVAL of action from Bonneville County Court, case number CV-10-4263.(Filing fee $350 receipt number0976-644451.) (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A - Complaint, # 3 Exhibit B - Summonses)(Bond, Brook)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 695 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?