Kline Enterprises Inc. v. Swenson

Federal Civil Lawsuit Idaho District Court, Case No. 1:11-cv-00535-BLW
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 9, 2019 at 12:41 PM EDT (6 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Kline Enterprises Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Suite 404

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ronald R Shepherd +1 208 887 3444 +1 208 887 3443 ron@rshepherdlaw.com
v.
No Logo Charles E. Hassard, Defendant
No Logo Dan Falls, Defendant

Represented by Dan Falls

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dan Falls +1 918 576 4797
No Logo Daniel Orr, Defendant

Represented by Daniel Orr

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Orr +1 918 292 9370
No Logo David Rottman, Defendant
No Logo David Swenson, Defendant
No Logo DBSI Tiegs 979 LLC, Defendant

Represented by dbsi.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey A. Warr +1 208 287 1895 +1 208 287 1801 jwarr@dbsi.com

Represented by Law Offices of Daniel C Green

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joshua D Johnson +1 208 395 0011 jdj@racinelaw.net
No Logo Douglas L. Swenson, Defendant

Represented by CALFO HARRIGAN LEYH & EAKES, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Angelo J Calfo +1 206 623 1700 +1 206 623 8717 angeloc@calfoharrigan.com
Space Shane P. Cramer +1 206 623 1700 shanec@calfoharrigan.com

Represented by HARRIGAN LEYH FARMER & THOMSEN LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patricia A Eakes +1 206 623 1700 +1 206 623 8717 pattye@calfoharrigan.com
Space Andrea Delgadillo Ostrovsky +1 206 623 1700 +1 206 623 8717 andreao@calfoharrigan.com
Space Daniel M Weiskopf +1 206 623 1700 +1 206 623 8717 danw@calfoharrigan.com

Represented by HEPWORTH JANIS & KLUKSDAL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kira Dale Pfisterer +1 208 343 7510 +1 208 342 2927 kdp@hepworthlaw.com

Represented by J.E. Losavio, Jr., Law Office of

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Joseph Janis +1 208 343 7510 +1 208 342 2927 johnjanis@aol.com

Represented by Yarmuth Wilsdon PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew Aaron Carvalho +1 206 516 3800 +1 206 516 3888 mcarvalho@yarmuth.com
Space Hozaifa Y Cassubhai +1 206 516 3800 hcassubhai@yarmuth.com
No Logo Gary Bringhurst, Defendant
No Logo Jeremy Swenson, Defendant

Represented by McKenzie Law Offices, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Curtis David McKenzie +1 208 344 4379 +1 208 331 2150 cdm@mckenzielawoffices.com
No Logo John and Jane Does 1-10, Defendant
No Logo John Mayeron, Defendant
No Logo Matthew Duckett, Defendant
No Logo Thomas A. Krause, Defendant
No Logo Thomas Var Reeve, Defendant

Represented by Stewart Taylor & Morris PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel W Bower +1 208 345 3333 +1 208 345 4461 dbower@stm-law.com
Space Monte N Stewart +1 208 345 3333 +1 208 345 4461 stewart@stm-law.com
Space Craig G. Taylor +1 208 345 3333 +1 208 345 4461 cgtaylor@stm-law.com
Attributes
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1961
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Timeline
  Entries (153) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 4/9/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Renew
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 2/28/2019, Entered: None Renew
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None Status Report
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None Judgment - Default
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Relief
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Relief Partial from Order (DKT. 115) Ronald R Shepherd appearing for Plaintiff Kline Enterprises Inc.. Responses due by 12/29/2014 (Shepherd, Ronald)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice (Thomas Var Reeve) by Kline Enterprises Inc., Thomas Var Reeve. (Shepherd, Ronald)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Attorney Fees Ronald R Shepherd appearing for Plaintiff Kline Enterprises Inc.. Responses due by 10/6/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Bill of Costs)(Shepherd, Ronald)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Douglas Swenson Ronald R Shepherd appearing for Plaintiff Kline Enterprises Inc.. Responses due by 10/6/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Affidavit, # 3 Affidavit)(Shepherd, Ronald)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of Service re 135 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, filed by Douglas L. Swenson . (Calfo, Angelo)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
MINUTE ORDER The Parties are advised that no response to a motion for reconsideration shall be filed unless requested by the court. The request will set a time when the response is due, and may limit briefing to particular issues or points raised by the motion, may authorize a reply, and may prescribe page limitations. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Granting Calfo Harrigan Leyh & Eakes LLP's and Hepworth, Janis & Kluksdal's Motion for Leave of Court to Withdraw Pursuant to Civil Rule 83.6. re 132 Attorney John Joseph Janis; Andrea D Ostrovsky; Kira Dale Pfisterer; Angelo J Calfo and Patricia A Eakes terminated. Signed by Judge Marsha J Pechman. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE by Kline Enterprises Inc. re 132 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Pursuant to Civil Rule 83.6 Nonobjection (Shepherd, Ronald)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Angelo J. Calfo re 132 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Pursuant to Civil Rule 83.6 filed by Douglas L. Swenson . (Calfo, Angelo)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Pursuant to Civil Rule 83.6 Angelo J Calfo appearing for Defendant Douglas L. Swenson. Responses due by 7/31/2014 (Calfo, Angelo)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE by Douglas L. Swenson Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel (Cramer, Shane)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE by Douglas L. Swenson re 128 Order, Re Joint Status Reports in DBSI-Related Cases (Calfo, Angelo)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None
STATUS REPORT SECOND JOINT by Kline Enterprises Inc., Thomas Var Reeve, Douglas L. Swenson. (Shepherd, Ronald)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 4/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER FOR JOINT STATUS REPORT Parties shall file a joint status report which is due 10 days following a jury verdict in the criminal case 1:13-cr-91-BLW. Signed by Judge Marsha J Pechman. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp) (Entered: 04/10/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER GRANTING STAY granting 119 Joint Motion to Stay Pending Resolution of the Criminal Trial. Signed by Judge Marsha J Pechman. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp) (Entered: 12/04/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marsha J Pechman: In Person Status Conference held on 11/26/2013. Counsel for Plaintiff: Ronald R. Shepherd. Defendants: Angelo J. Calfo, Craig Gerald Taylor, Jeremy Swenson. (Court Reporter/ESR Roxanne Patchell.) (jp) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marsha J Pechman: Motion Hearing held on 11/26/2013 re 119 Joint MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of the Criminal Case. oral argument was presented. The Court orders the case stayed until 10 days after a verdict is reached in the criminal case USA v. Swenson, 1:13-cr-00091-BLW. (Court Reporter/ESR Rozanne Patchell.) (cjm) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE : Oral argument is scheduled for Tuesday, November 26, 2013 at 9:00 a.m. in Boise Courtroom #1 regarding the pending motion to stay. The Court will permit telephonic appearance for those parties who will not argue the motion. Any person wishing to argue must be present in person. Dial in number is 1-888-684-8852, access code 2777014, and security code 2222. (so)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE : A status conference is scheduled for Tuesday, November 26, 2013 at 10:00 a.m. in Boise Courtroom #1. The Court will permit telephonic appearance for those parties who will not argue any motions or present on the status of the case. Any person wishing to argue must be present in person. Dial in number is 1-888-684-8852, access code 2777014, and security code 2222. (so)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE ORDER ( An in person Status Conference set for 11/26/2013 10:00 AM in Boise - Courtroom 1 before Judge Marsha J Pechman.). Signed by Judge Marsha J Pechman. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None
STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Kline Enterprises Inc., Thomas Var Reeve, Douglas L. Swenson. (Calfo, Angelo)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER - The following Minute Order is made by direction of the Court, the Honorable Marsha J. Pechman, United States District Judge: The parties have not complied with the order 118 directing that a joint status report be filed by October 22, 2013. The Court is aware the parties have filed a motion to stay the case 119 pending an outcome in the criminal case, United States v. Swenson, et al., CR-13-91-S-BLW, but the motion does not stand in place of the joint status report. The time for filing the report is hereby extended to ten days from the date of this order. If the report is not filed by that time, sanctions may be ordered. Sanctions may include dismissal of the action without prejudice. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman (sbh).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None
Joint MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of the Criminal Case Patricia A Eakes appearing for Plaintiff Kline Enterprises Inc., Defendants Thomas Var Reeve, Douglas L. Swenson. Responses due by 11/15/2013 (Eakes, Patricia)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER FOR JOINT STATUS REPORT, (Combined Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan due by 10/22/2013). Signed by Judge Marsha J Pechman. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp) (Entered: 10/08/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT. The case number shall now be 1:11-cv-535-S-MJP. The parties shall use this case number on all future filings. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (krb)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE by Charles E. Hassard, John Mayeron, Thomas Var Reeve Notice of Change of Firm Name and Email Addresses (Stewart, Monte)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER re 114 Notice of Bankruptcy Filing filed by Charles E. Hassard. The instant case shall be automatically stayed pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 362 until the stay is lifted by the Bankruptcy Court or other motion is granted allowing the case to proceed without violating 11 U.S.C. 362. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (krb)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY FILING Upon the Record by Charles E. Hassard (Stewart, Monte)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Substitution - Attorney Ron R Shepherd for Kline Enterprises Inc. added. Attorney Ronald R Shepherd terminated. (Shepherd, Ronald)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER - DISREGARD 111 Order reassigning the case to Judge Lodge entered on May 2, 2013. It was entered incorrectly in this case. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. ((jsv)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER - Finding good cause, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that this case is reassigned for all purposes to Judge Edward J. Lodge. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, that the Clerk shall take the necessary steps to change theCase Number accordingly. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. ((jsv)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 4/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER. Case reassigned to Judge Edward J. Lodge for all further proceedings. Judge B. Lynn Winmill no longer assigned to case. The hearing set before Judge Winmill for May 20, 2013 is VACATED. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (krb)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER The Case Management Order 18 is VACATED. The motion to amend 85 and the motion to vacate case management order 107 are GRANTED. The motion for a hearing 99 is DENIED. Counsel shall contact Jamie Gearhart (208-334-9021) to set up a new Scheduling Conference after the Court rules on Douglas Swensons pending motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (dm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT re 102 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney,, filed by Gary Bringhurst . (McKenzie, Curtis)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None
MOTION to Vacate 18 Order, Set Deadlines,, Case Management Order ( Responses due by 4/22/2013), MOTION for Hearing Telephonic Scheduling Conference Ronald R Shepherd appearing for Plaintiff Kline Enterprises Inc.. (Shepherd, Ronald)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None
Answer to Second Amended Complaint ANSWER to 52 Amended Complaint by Thomas Var Reeve.(Stewart, Monte)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 105 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMORANDUM DECISION ORDER granting in part and denying in part 71 Motion to Dismiss. It is granted to the extent it seeks an evidentiary hearing. It is denied in all other respects, without prejudice to the right of Swenson to file a new motio n under Rule 12(b)(5) supported by affidavits to streamline the presentation at the evidentiary hearing. An evidentiary hearing be held on May 20, 2013, at 9:00 a.m. in the Federal Courthouse in Boise, Idaho. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (krb)
LREF
Blank 105 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMORANDUM DECISION ORDER granting in part and denying in part 71 Motion to Dismiss. It is granted to the extent it seeks an evidentiary hearing. It is denied in all other respects, without prejudice to the right of Swenson to file a new motion under Rule 12(b)(5) supported by affidavits to streamline the presentation at the evidentiary hearing. An evidentiary hearing be held on May 20, 2013, at 9:00 a.m. in the Federal Courthouse in Boise, Idaho. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (krb)
LREF
Blank 104 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 61 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (krb)
LREF
Blank 104 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 61 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (krb)
LREF
Blank 103 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 49 Motion for Reconsideration ; deeming as moot 64 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Defendant Gary Bringhurst is hereby DISMISSED as a defendant. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (krb)
LREF
Blank 103 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 49 Motion for Reconsideration ; deeming as moot 64 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Defendant Gary Bringhurst is hereby DISMISSED as a defendant. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (krb)
LREF
Blank 102 Filed: 3/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 101 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Counsel must continue to represent Gary Bringhurst until proof of service of this Order on the Client has been filed with the Court. Gary Bringhurst will be allowed twenty-one (21) days after th e filing of proof of service by Counsel to advise the Court in writing in what manner each client will be represented. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (krb)
LREF
Blank 102 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 101 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Counsel must continue to represent Gary Bringhurst until proof of service of this Order on the Client has been filed with the Court. Gary Bringhurst will be allowed twenty-one (21) days after the filing of proof of service by Counsel to advise the Court in writing in what manner each client will be represented. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (krb)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 3/8/2013, Entered: None
Expedited MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Curtis David McKenzie appearing for Defendant Gary Bringhurst. Responses due by 4/1/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McKenzie, Curtis)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 3/8/2013, Entered: None
AMENDED DOCUMENT by Kline Enterprises Inc.. Amendment to 99 MOTION for Hearing re 85 MOTION to Amend/Correct 18 Order, Set Deadlines,, Extend Time to Amend Pleadings and Disclose Experts, 71 MOTION to Dismiss and for Evidentiary Hearing, 61 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO Amended Certificate of Delivery. (Shepherd, Ronald)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 3/7/2013, Entered: None
MOTION for Hearing re 85 MOTION to Amend/Correct 18 Order, Set Deadlines,, Extend Time to Amend Pleadings and Disclose Experts, 71 MOTION to Dismiss and for Evidentiary Hearing, 61 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , 49 MOTION for Reconsideration re 47 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Ronald R Shepherd appearing for Plaintiff Kline Enterprises Inc.. Responses due by 4/1/2013 (Shepherd, Ronald)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving 97 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Shane Cramer for Douglas L. Swenson Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (krb)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None
MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Shane P. Kramer. ( Filing fee $ 225 receipt number 0976-990833.)Kira Dale Pfisterer appearing for Defendant Douglas L. Swenson. Responses due by 3/29/2013 (Pfisterer, Kira)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE by Douglas L. Swenson Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel (Weiskopf, Daniel)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 1/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
Docket Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Candy W Dale: Appearance by: Ronald Shepherd for the Plaintiff; Angelo Calfo and Dan Weiskopf for Defendant Douglas Swenson; Monte Stewart for Defendants Var Reeve and Charles Hassard. Telephonic Status Conference held on 1/10/2013. Parties have continued private settlement discussions as previously directed. All matters not fully resolved. At this time, it does not appear that a Judicially Supervised Settlement Conference will be necessary. Counsel to notify the Court if further assistance is needed. Time in Court 10 mins. (Hearing not recorded.) (ah) (Entered: 01/14/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 12/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER granting 92 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Matthew A Carvalho and Hozaifa Y Cassubhai terminated. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (dm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF DBSI TIEGS 979, LLC re 91 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by DBSI Tiegs 979 LLC. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (krb) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Matthew Carvalho Kira Dale Pfisterer appearing for Defendant Douglas L. Swenson. Responses due by 1/14/2013 (Pfisterer, Kira)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by DBSI Tiegs 979 LLC. (Johnson, Joshua)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER DISMISSING JEREMY SWENSON AND DAVID SWENSON re 89 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Kline Enterprises Inc.. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (krb) (Entered: 12/06/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal (Jeremy Swenson and David Swenson) by Kline Enterprises Inc.. (Shepherd, Ronald)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion re 85 MOTION to Amend/Correct 18 Order, Set Deadlines,, Extend Time to Amend Pleadings and Disclose Experts filed by Douglas L. Swenson. Replies due by 12/7/2012.(Weiskopf, Daniel)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Docket Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Candy W Dale: Appearance by Ronald Shepherd for the Plaintiff; Angelo Calfo and Kira Pfisterer for Defendant Douglas Swenson; Monte Stewart for Defendants Var Reeve and Charles Hassard. Telephonic Status Conference held on 11/16/2012. Parties have engaged in private settlement discussions as previously directed. All matters not fully resolved at this time. Counsel to notify the Court if further assistance is needed. (Telephonic Status Conference set for 1/10/2013 04:30 PM MST in Pocatello Chambers before Judge Candy W Dale. On the date and time specified above, counsel shall call the Court's conferencing phone number at 1-888-273-3658, enter access code 5475731 and security code 5637, then follow the operator's instructions.) Time in Court 10 mins. (Hearing not recorded.) (ah)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 11/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Candy W Dale: Telephonic Status Conference held on 11/6/2012. Following discussion between Court and counsel, the Settlement Conference currently set for 11/9/2012 09:30 AM in Boise - Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W Dale is hereby VACATED and shall be re-set at a later date, if necessary. Parties are directed to engage in private settlement discussions and provide a joint status report to the Court, via telephone, on 11/16/2012. (Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/16/2012 02:00 PM MST in Boise Chambers before Judge Candy W Dale. For call-in instructions, see attached PDF.) (Hearing not recorded.) (ah)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 10/29/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to Amend/Correct 18 Case Management Order, Extend Time to Amend Pleadings and Disclose Experts Ronald R Shepherd appearing for Plaintiff Kline Enterprises Inc. Responses due by 11/23/2012 (Shepherd, Ronald) Modified on 10/30/2012 to edit text for linked document (cjm).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 10/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/6/2012 02:30 PM MST in Boise Chambers before Judge Candy W Dale. On the date and time specified above, counsel shall call the Court's conferencing phone number at 1-888-273-3658, enter access code 5475731 and security code 5637, then follow the operator's instructions. (ah)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 10/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER. Settlement Conference set for 11/9/2012 09:30 AM in Boise - Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W Dale. Each party shall prepare a response to the questionnaire and submit it to Judge Dales chambers for in camera review no later than 11/2/2012. Signed by Judge Candy W Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER - Due to the recusal filed by Judge Larry M. Boyle 81 filed on October 10, 2012, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the Order of Referral 80 is hereby vacated. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT this matter shall be referred to Chief U.S. Magistrate Judge Candy Wagahoff Dale for the purpose of conducting a Settlement Conference. Local Rule 16.4. The parties shall contact Amy Hickox, Judge Dale's In-Court Deputy on or before October 26, 2012 to schedule the Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill (sbh).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER OF RECUSAL re 80 : Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 455(a), the undersigned Magistrate Judge hereby issues this order recusing himself from any further proceedings in this matter. The parties shall contact Susie Boring-Headlee,the Court ADR Coordinator, to select another neutral.. Signed by Judge Larry M. Boyle. ((bk)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER - In accordance with the parties agreement 15 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT this matter is referred to United States Magistrate Judge Larry M. Boyle, United States District Court for the District of Idaho, for the purpose of conducting a settlement conference. Local Rule 16.4. The parties shall contact Brandon Karpen, the Judge's Law Clerk at (208) 334-9010 no later than October 19, 2012 to schedule the settlement conference. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill (sbh).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 9/17/2012, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 71 MOTION to Dismiss and for Evidentiary Hearing filed by Douglas L. Swenson.(Pfisterer, Kira)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 8/30/2012, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 71 MOTION to Dismiss and for Evidentiary Hearing filed by Kline Enterprises Inc.. Replies due by 9/17/2012.(Shepherd, Ronald)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/30/2012, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 61 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted filed by Thomas Var Reeve.(Stewart, Monte)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 8/16/2012, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion re 64 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Kline Enterprises Inc.. Replies due by 9/4/2012.(Shepherd, Ronald)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/15/2012, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kline Enterprises Inc. re 73 Response to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted by Defendant Var Reeve (Shepherd, Ronald)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 8/13/2012, Entered: None
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving 69 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Angelo J Calfo for Douglas L. Swenson; approving 70 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Daniel M Weiskopf for Douglas L. Swenson. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 8/13/2012, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion re 61 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Var Reeve filed by Kline Enterprises Inc.. Replies due by 8/30/2012.(Shepherd, Ronald)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/6/2012, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Support re 71 MOTION to Dismiss and for Evidentiary Hearing filed by Douglas L. Swenson.(Pfisterer, Kira)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/6/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to Dismiss and for Evidentiary Hearing Kira Dale Pfisterer appearing for Defendant Douglas L. Swenson. Responses due by 8/30/2012 (Pfisterer, Kira)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/6/2012, Entered: None
MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Daniel M. Weiskopf. ( Filing fee $ 225 receipt number 0976-914460.)Kira Dale Pfisterer appearing for Defendant Douglas L. Swenson. Responses due by 8/30/2012 (Pfisterer, Kira)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/6/2012, Entered: None
MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Angelo J. Calfo. ( Filing fee $ 225 receipt number 0976-914437.)Kira Dale Pfisterer appearing for Defendant Douglas L. Swenson. Responses due by 8/30/2012 (Pfisterer, Kira)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER -- The Stipulation 67 is APPROVED. Defendant Douglas Swenson shall file any motion to dismiss on or before August 6, 2012. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (dm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/27/2012, Entered: None
STIPULATION For Extension of Deadline for Defendant Douglas Swenson to File a Motion to Dismiss by Kline Enterprises Inc., Douglas L. Swenson. (Shepherd, Ronald)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/27/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Change of Address by Kira Dale Pfisterer (Pfisterer, Kira)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER re 60 Stipulation of Dismissal. This cause is hereby dismissed with prejudice as to Daniel Orr only. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm) (Entered: 07/23/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/21/2012, Entered: None
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Curtis David McKenzie appearing for Defendants Gary Bringhurst, David Swenson, Jeremy Swenson. Responses due by 8/16/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(McKenzie, Curtis)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: None
ANSWER to 52 Amended Complaint by DBSI Tiegs 979 LLC.(Johnson, Joshua)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: None
Charles Hassard's Answer to Second Amended Complaint ANSWER to 52 Amended Complaint by Charles E. Hassard.(Stewart, Monte)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: None
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Monte N Stewart appearing for Defendant Thomas Var Reeve. Responses due by 8/13/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(Stewart, Monte)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Daniel Orr by Kline Enterprises Inc.. (Shepherd, Ronald)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/14/2012, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Curtis McKenzie re 58 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Gary Bringhurst, David Swenson . (McKenzie, Curtis)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/14/2012, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 49 MOTION for Reconsideration re 47 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion to Dismiss, filed by Gary Bringhurst, David Swenson. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(McKenzie, Curtis) Modified on 7/16/2012 to remove erroneous commas from text (cjm).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/12/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Kira Dale Pfisterer on behalf of Douglas L. Swenson (Pfisterer, Kira)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER DISMISSING DAN FALLS re 55 Stipulation of Dismissal. This cause is hereby dismissed with prejudice as to Dan Falls only. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal Dan Falls by Kline Enterprises Inc.. (Shepherd, Ronald)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/28/2012, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion re 49 MOTION for Reconsideration re 47 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Kline Enterprises Inc.. Replies due by 7/16/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Ron R. Shepherd in Opposition to Motion for Reconsideration, # 2 Exhibit "A")(Shepherd, Ronald)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE by Kline Enterprises Inc. of Dismissal (Matthew Duckett; David Rottman; and Thomas A. Krause ONLY) (Shepherd, Ronald)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/20/2012, Entered: None
AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second) against All Defendants, filed by Kline Enterprises Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Legal Description, # 2 Exhibit Legal Description)(Shepherd, Ronald)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: None
RETURN MAIL undelivered as to Daniel Orr, 5382 E 81st Street 938, Tulsa, OK 4137 re: 47 Memorandum Decision and Order(cjm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/18/2012, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Curtis McKenzie re 49 MOTION for Reconsideration re 47 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion to Dismiss, filed by Gary Bringhurst, David Swenson . (McKenzie, Curtis) Modified on 6/19/2012 to remove erroneous errors(cjm).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: None
MOTION for Reconsideration re 47 Memorandum Decision and Order on Motion to Dismiss Curtis David McKenzie appearing for Defendants Gary Bringhurst, David Swenson. Responses due by 7/9/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Affidavit of Curtis D. McKenzie)(McKenzie, Curtis) Modified on 6/15/2012 to edit text to remove erroneous commas (cjm).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: None
Summons Reissued as to Douglas L. Swenson. (cjm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 21 Motion to Dismiss; denying without prejudice; 22 Motion to Dismiss; denying without prejudice 24 Motion to Dismiss; granting 25 Motion to Extend Time. John Mayeron is dismissed as a defendant in this action. Plaintiff shall file a Second Amended Complaint within 14 days from the date of this Order. Plaintiff has 120 days from the date of this Order to serve Douglas Swenson. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm) (Entered: 06/07/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: None
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving 45 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Hozaifa Y Cassubhai for Douglas L. Swenson. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/29/2012, Entered: None
MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Hozaifa Y. Cassubhai. ( Filing fee $ 225 receipt number 0976-888656.)Kira Dale Pfisterer appearing for Defendant Douglas L. Swenson. Responses due by 6/22/2012 (Pfisterer, Kira)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/9/2012, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 22 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted filed by Charles E. Hassard, Thomas Var Reeve.(Stewart, Monte) Modified on 4/10/2012 to remove ex parte designation from docket text (cjm).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/9/2012, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 21 MOTION to Dismiss Because of Untimely Service of Process filed by John Mayeron.(Stewart, Monte) Modified on 4/10/2012 to remove ex parte designation from docket text (cjm).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/4/2012, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 25 MOTION Extend Time to Serve Defendant Douglas Swenson re 8 Summons Issued, 1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Removal, Notice of Removal Doc 1-3 State Court Amended Complaint filed by Kline Enterprises Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Shepherd, Ronald)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/28/2012, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kline Enterprises Inc. re 39 Response to Motion, 38 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, 40 Response to Motion, 37 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, 36 Response to Motion AMENDED (Shepherd, Ronald)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion re 24 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Kline Enterprises Inc.. Replies due by 4/12/2012.(Shepherd, Ronald)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion re 22 EX PARTE MOTION MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted filed by Kline Enterprises Inc.. Replies due by 4/12/2012.(Shepherd, Ronald)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT in Opposition by Ron R. Shepherd re 12 MOTION for Entry of Default, 21 EX PARTE MOTION MOTION to Dismiss Because of Untimely Service of Process filed by Kline Enterprises Inc.. Replies due by 4/12/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Shepherd, Ronald)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT in Opposition by Joanne Kresse re 21 EX PARTE MOTION MOTION to Dismiss Because of Untimely Service of Process filed by Kline Enterprises Inc.. Replies due by 4/12/2012.(Shepherd, Ronald)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion re 21 EX PARTE MOTION MOTION to Dismiss Because of Untimely Service of Process filed by Kline Enterprises Inc.. Replies due by 4/12/2012.(Shepherd, Ronald)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Matthew A. Carvalho in Opposition re 25 MOTION Extend Time to Serve Defendant Douglas Swenson re 8 Summons Issued, 1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Removal, Notice of Removal Doc 1-3 State Court Amended Complaint filed by Douglas L. Swenson . (Carvalho, Matthew)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 25 MOTION Extend Time to Serve Defendant Douglas Swenson re 8 Summons Issued, 1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Removal, Notice of Removal Doc 1-3 State Court Amended Complaint filed by Douglas L. Swenson. Replies due by 4/12/2012.(Carvalho, Matthew)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving 27 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Andrea D Ostrovsky for Douglas L. Swenson; approving 28 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Patricia A Eakes for Douglas L. Swenson; approving 29 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Matthew A Carvalho for Douglas L. Swenson. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) also re: 30 Errata; 31 Errata; 32 Errata. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by cjm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: None
ERRATA by Defendant Douglas L. Swenson re 27 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Andrea D. Ostrovsky. ( Filing fee $ 225 receipt number 0976-857130.). (Pfisterer, Kira)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: None
ERRATA by Defendant Douglas L. Swenson re 28 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Patricia Eakes. ( Filing fee $ 225 receipt number 0976-857137.). (Pfisterer, Kira)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: None
ERRATA by Defendant Douglas L. Swenson re 29 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Matthew Carvalho. ( Filing fee $ 225 receipt number 0976-857142.). (Pfisterer, Kira)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: None
MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Matthew Carvalho. ( Filing fee $ 225 receipt number 0976-857142.)Kira Dale Pfisterer appearing for Defendant Douglas L. Swenson. Responses due by 4/2/2012 (Pfisterer, Kira)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: None
MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Patricia Eakes. ( Filing fee $ 225 receipt number 0976-857137.)Kira Dale Pfisterer appearing for Defendant Douglas L. Swenson. Responses due by 4/2/2012 (Pfisterer, Kira)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: None
MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Andrea D. Ostrovsky. ( Filing fee $ 225 receipt number 0976-857130.)Kira Dale Pfisterer appearing for Defendant Douglas L. Swenson. Responses due by 4/2/2012 (Pfisterer, Kira)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by John Joseph Janis on behalf of Douglas L. Swenson (Janis, John)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: None
MOTION Extend Time to Serve Defendant Douglas Swenson re 8 Summons Issued, 1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Removal, Notice of Removal Doc 1-3 State Court Amended Complaint Ronald R Shepherd appearing for Plaintiff Kline Enterprises Inc.. Responses due by 3/26/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support Motion to Extend Time to Serve Defendant Douglas Swenson, # 2 Affidavit Joanne Kresse, # 3 Affidavit Ron R. Shepherd, # 4 Affidavit Ron Nelson, # 5 Affidavit Brenda Seeger)(Shepherd, Ronald)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to Dismiss Curtis David McKenzie appearing for Defendants Gary Bringhurst, David Swenson, Jeremy Swenson. Responses due by 3/26/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(McKenzie, Curtis)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/28/2012, Entered: None
ANSWER to Complaint by Daniel Orr.(cjm) (Entered: 02/29/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted ( Responses due by 3/26/2012)Monte N Stewart appearing for Defendants Charles E. Hassard, Thomas Var Reeve. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(Stewart, Monte) Modified on 3/1/2012 to remove ex parte designation and regenerate NEF (cjm).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: None
MOTION to Dismiss Because of Untimely Service of Process ( Responses due by 3/26/2012)Monte N Stewart appearing for Defendant John Mayeron. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Appendix Part 1 of 2, # 3 Appendix Part 2 of 2)(Stewart, Monte) Modified on 3/1/2012 to remove ex parte designation and regenerate NEF (cjm).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: None
ANSWER to Complaint by DBSI Tiegs 979 LLC.(Johnson, Joshua)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/27/2012, Entered: None
ANSWER to Complaint by Dan Falls.(cjm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 18 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER, ( ADR Plan to be filed by 10/1/2012., Amended Pleadings due by 11/1/2012., Discovery due by 2/1/2013., Joinder of Parties due by 11/1/2012., Motions due by 4/15/2013.). Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by krb)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/26/2012, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kline Enterprises Inc.. David Rottman served on 11/1/2011, answer due 11/22/2011. (Shepherd, Ronald)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kline Enterprises Inc. re 15 ADR Plan Litigation Plan - Alternate Dispute Resolution of Options (Shepherd, Ronald)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: None
LITIGATION PLAN/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FROM by Plaintiff Kline Enterprises Inc.(Shepherd, Ronald) Modified on 1/23/2012 to correct event text to properly reflect document filed per attorney request (cjm).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/16/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Curtis David McKenzie on behalf of Gary Bringhurst, David Swenson (McKenzie, Curtis)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/16/2012, Entered: None
WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Kline Enterprises Inc. re 12 MOTION for Entry of Default Withdrawal of (Shepherd, Ronald) Modified on 1/17/2012 to edit event type text (cjm).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: None
MOTION for Entry of Default Ronald R Shepherd appearing for Plaintiff Kline Enterprises Inc.. Responses due by 2/6/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Ron R. Shepherd)(Shepherd, Ronald)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF HEARING - A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 1/27/2012 at 1:30 PM before Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (Attachments: # 1 Litigation Plan Letter, # 2 Litigation Plan)(jlg)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/9/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Monte N Stewart on behalf of John Mayeron (Stewart, Monte)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on John Mayeron on 10/31/2011, filed by Kline Enterprises Inc.., SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kline Enterprises Inc.. John Mayeron served on 10/31/2011, answer due 11/21/2011. (Shepherd, Ronald)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None
Summons Issued as to Thomas A. Krause, Douglas L. Swenson. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(jm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
AMENDED DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Hearing: Per the request of counsel in this matter, the Telephonic Scheduling Conference currently set for 1/11/2012 01:30 PM is hereby VACATED and RE-SET for 1/27/2012 01:30 PM Telephonic Hearing - Boise Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W Dale. Counsel for Plaintiff to initiate the conference call and when all parties are on the line, connect to the courtroom at 208-334-1504. Counsel to file Litigation Plan(s) on or before 1/20/2012. (ah)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 1/11/2012 01:30 PM Telephonic Hearing - Boise Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W Dale. Attachments: (1) Litigation Plan Letter, # 2 Litigation Plan) (ah)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua D Johnson on behalf of DBSI Tiegs 979 LLC (Johnson, Joshua)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (jm) (Entered: 11/08/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kline Enterprises Inc.. (Shepherd, Ronald)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for DBSI Tiegs 979 LLC, Charles E. Hassard, Kline Enterprises Inc., Thomas Var Reeve, Jeremy Swenson re 1 Notice of Removal, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 1/6/2012. (jm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/3/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Thomas Var Reeve, Charles E. Hassard from Third Judicial District, case number CV 2011-0423.(Filing fee $350 receipt number0976-812246.), filed by Thomas Var Reeve, Charles E. Hassard. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet, # 2 State Court Complaint, # 3 State Court Amended Complaint, # 4 Summons-Charles Hassard, # 5 Summons-Thomas Var Reeve, # 6 Notice of Appearance-Jeremy Swenson, # 7 Notice of Appearance-DBSI Tiegs, # 8 State Court Affidavits of Service, # 9 State Court Notice of Removal, # 10 State Court ROA)(Stewart, Monte)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 18 Filed: 1/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER, ( ADR Plan to be filed by 10/1/2012., Amended Pleadings due by 11/1/2012., Discovery due by 2/1/2013., Joinder of Parties due by 11/1/2012., Motions due by 4/15/2013.). Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by krb)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 55 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?