CISCO Systems Inc. v. Innovatio IP Ventures LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:11-cv-09309
District Judge James F. Holderman, presiding

Tags
Last Updated January 7, 2019 at 1:52 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Cisco Systems, Inc. Cisco Systems, Inc., Plaintiff
Unknown Role, Lumera Corp
Unknown Role, Control4 Corp
Unknown Role, Mavenir Systems, Inc.
Unknown Role, Mulesource, Inc.
Unknown Role, Aquantia Corp
Unknown Role, Active Voice Corp
Unknown Role, Starent Networks Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amanda Jean Hollis +1 312 876 7700 amanda.hollis@lw.com

Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Motorola Solutions, Inc. Motorola Solutions, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

v.
No Logo Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Laurence Dorsney +1 302 984 6087 kdorsney@potteranderson.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice. Civil case terminated. Signed by the Honorable James F. Holderman on 2/21/2014. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: None
    MINUTE entry before Honorable James F. Holderman: This case is consolidated with 11 C 9308, as the lead case number in MDL 2303. All further filings should be made in 11 C 9308 as the established lead case for MDL 2303; the individual case number should also be displayed on the documents filed, if the document only pertains to the individual case number. Mailed notice (tlm) (Entered: 02/15/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
      EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: It is hereby ordered that Magistrate Judge Sidney Schenkier is to be the designated magistrate judge in 11 C 1638, Innovation IP Ventures v. ABP Corporation, et al., 11 C 9308, in re: Innovation IP Ventures Patent Litigation, 11 C 9309, Cisco Systems, Inc., et al. v. InnovationVentures, and 11 C 9311, Innovation Ventures v. MEI-GSR Holdings. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/13/2012. (tlm) (Entered: 01/13/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: None
        RECEIVED from Delaware; Case Number 1:11-cv-00425 . (lcw) (Entered: 01/03/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: None
          MDL Transfer ORDER (MDL No. 2303) -- case transferred to USDC/ND/IL. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/3/2012.] (Entered: 01/03/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: None
            Letter to Clerk USDC/DE from Clerk USDC/ND/IL regarding MDL Transfer Order. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/3/2012.] (Entered: 01/03/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/17/2011, Entered: None
              Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Kenneth Dorsney and Matthew McAndrews regarding Response to Plaintiff's November 7th Letter - re 22 Letter. (Dorsney, Kenneth) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/3/2012.] (Entered: 11/17/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None
                Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding update on three events that have occurred since the October 7, 2011 hearing on Innovatio's motion to dismiss. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Blumenfeld, Jack) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/3/2012.] (Entered: 11/07/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                  Official Transcript of Oral Argument Hearing held on October 7, 2011 before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/10/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/21/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/18/2012. (bpg) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/3/2012.] (Entered: 10/20/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None
                    MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Matthew G. McAndrews - filed by Innovatio IP Ventures LLC. (Dorsney, Kenneth) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/3/2012.] (Entered: 09/30/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Oral Argument scheduled for 10/6/11 at 10:30 AM is CANCELLED; the Oral Argument is hereby rescheduled for 10/7/11 at 2:00 PM. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/27/11. (ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/3/2012.] (Entered: 09/27/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court will hear argument on the pending motions on October 6, 2011 beginning at 10:30 a.m. Each side will be allocated up to 30 minutes to present its argument. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/8/11.(ntl) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/3/2012.] (Entered: 09/08/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None
                          Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding request for oral argument on Innovatio's motion to dismiss or transfer - re 8 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Dismiss or in the Alternative Transfer Case to Illinois. (Blumenfeld, Jack) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/3/2012.] (Entered: 08/10/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/4/2011, Entered: None
                            DECLARATION re 15 Reply Brief Declaration of Matthew McAndrews in Support of Defendant's Reply Memorandum in Support of Its Motion to Transfer or Dismiss by Innovatio IP Ventures LLC. (Dorsney, Kenneth) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/3/2012.] (Entered: 08/04/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/4/2011, Entered: None
                              REPLY BRIEF re 8 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Dismiss or in the Alternative Transfer Case to Illinois filed by Innovatio IP Ventures LLC. (Dorsney, Kenneth) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/3/2012.] (Entered: 08/04/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank 14 Filed: 7/25/2011, Entered: None
                                DECLARATION re 13 Answering Brief in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Transfer the Case to Illinois -- Declaration of Jared M. Barcenas -- by CISCO Systems Inc., Motorola Solutions Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-13, # 2 Exhibits 14-18)(Blumenfeld, Jack) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/3/2012.] (Entered: 07/25/2011)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/25/2011, Entered: None
                                  ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 8 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Dismiss or in the Alternative Transfer Case to Illinois filed by CISCO Systems Inc., Motorola Solutions Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 8/4/2011. (Blumenfeld, Jack) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/3/2012.] (Entered: 07/25/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/25/2011, Entered: None
                                    MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jared Barcenas - filed by CISCO Systems Inc., Motorola Solutions Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/3/2012.] (Entered: 07/25/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None
                                      MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Steven Cherny, Adam Alper, Gianni Cutri, Amanda Hollis and Jason Wejnert - filed by CISCO Systems Inc., Motorola Solutions Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/3/2012.] (Entered: 07/12/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/7/2011, Entered: None
                                        DECLARATION re 9 Opening Brief in Support Declaration of Matthew McAndrews in Support of Motion to Dismiss or Transfer to Illinois by Innovatio IP Ventures LLC. (Dorsney, Kenneth) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/3/2012.] (Entered: 07/07/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/7/2011, Entered: None
                                          OPENING BRIEF in Support re 8 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Dismiss or in the Alternative Transfer Case to Illinois filed by Innovatio IP Ventures LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 7/25/2011. (Dorsney, Kenneth) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/3/2012.] (Entered: 07/07/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/7/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                            MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Dismiss or in the Alternative Transfer Case to Illinois - filed by Innovatio IP Ventures LLC. (Dorsney, Kenneth) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/3/2012.] (Entered: 07/07/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: None
                                              STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint for Declaratory Judgment to July 7, 2011 - filed by CISCO Systems Inc., Innovatio IP Ventures LLC, Motorola Solutions Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/3/2012.] (Entered: 06/06/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by CISCO Systems Inc., Motorola Solutions Inc.. Innovatio IP Ventures LLC served on 5/17/2011, answer due 6/7/2011. (Smith, Rodger) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/3/2012.] (Entered: 05/17/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                  Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Motorola Solutions Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Icahn Associates Corporation for Motorola Solutions Inc.. (els) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/3/2012.] (Entered: 05/16/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                    Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by CISCO Systems Inc.. (els) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/3/2012.] (Entered: 05/16/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                      Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) SEE REPORT FOR PATENT NOS. (els) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/3/2012.] (Entered: 05/16/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (els) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/3/2012.] (Entered: 05/16/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                          COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Innovatio IP Ventures LLC - ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0311-888649.) - filed by CISCO Systems Inc., Motorola Solutions Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-9, # 2 Exhibit 10, # 3 Exhibit 11-14, # 4 Exhibit 15-17, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet)(els) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/3/2012.] (Entered: 05/16/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 655 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?