Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC v. MEI-GSR Holdings LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:11-cv-09311
District Judge James F. Holderman, presiding

Tags
Last Updated July 23, 2017 at 4:57 PM DT (3.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Niro, Scavone, Haller & Niro, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew G. McAndrews +1 312 236 0733 +2363 236 236 3137 mmcandrews@nshn.com

Represented by Watson Rounds, PC

No Logo Mei-gsr Holdings LLC, Counter-Claimant

Represented by Armstrong Teasdale LLP

v.
No Logo Mei-gsr Holdings LLC, Defendant

Represented by Armstrong Teasdale LLP

No Logo Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Niro, Scavone, Haller & Niro, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew G. McAndrews +1 312 236 0733 +2363 236 236 3137 mmcandrews@nshn.com

Represented by Watson Rounds, PC

Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (41) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. On this day, Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC, Innovatio Management, LLC and Noel B. Whitley (collectively, "Innovatio") and MEI-GSR Holdings LLC d/b/a Grand Sierra Resort and Casino announced to the Court that they have settled their respective claims for relief asserted in the above-captioned actions. The Court, having considered this request, is of the opinion that their request for dismissal should be GRANTED. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that all claims and counterclaims by Innovatio against Defendant and by Defendant against Innovatio in the above-captioned actions, including Case Nos. 1:11-cv-09308 (consolidated) and 11-cv-09311 (originally 3:11-cv-00343 (D. Nev.)), are dismissed, with prejudice to the re-filing of same. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all attorneys fees, costs of court and expenses shall be borne by the party incurring the same. This is a final judgment. Signed by the Honorable James F. Holderman on 5/15/2014. Notice mailed by judge's staff(ntf, ) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: None
    MINUTE entry before Honorable James F. Holderman: This case is consolidated with 11 C 9308, as the lead case number in MDL 2303. All further filings should be made in 11 C 9308 as the established lead case for MDL 2303; the individual case number should also be displayed on the documents filed, if the document only pertains to the individual case number.Mailed notice (mjc, ) (Entered: 02/15/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: None
      RECEIVED from Nevada; Case Number 3:11-cv-00343 . (lcw) (Entered: 01/03/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 38 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: None
        CERTIFIED COPY OF MDL TRANSFER ORDER - MDL No. 2303 - Northern District of Illinois Case No. 11C9311; Lead Case No. 11C9308. This action is transferred to the Northern District of Illinois and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable James F. Holderman. Signed by John G. Heyburn II, Chairman. ( Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter )(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) [Transferred from Nevada on 1/3/2012.] (Entered: 01/03/2012)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDERED that D's # 27 Motion to Stay is DENIED as moot, and this court's # 35 Order granting a 30-day stay is VACATED. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 12/29/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) [Transferred from Nevada on 1/3/2012.] (Entered: 12/29/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/28/2011, Entered: None
            NOTICE OF MDL TRANSFER ORDER. MDL No. 2303. This is for informational purposes only. No action is required at this time. A transfer order has been filed today in this litigation (FLM/8:11-cv-01325). A Certified copy of this order from the transferee court along with notification of the newly assigned case number(s) in that district. Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi on 12/28/2011. (KO) [Transferred from Nevada on 1/3/2012.] (Entered: 12/28/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
              VACATED PER # 37 ORDER : ORDER STAYING CASE for 30 days pending a decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation or further order of the court. D's # 27 Motion to Stay shall remain pending. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 12/22/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) Modified on 12/29/2011 to denote stay VACATED (DRM). [Transferred from Nevada on 1/3/2012.] (Entered: 12/27/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/26/2011, Entered: None
                REPLY to Response to 27 First MOTION to Stay This Matter ; filed by Defendant MEI-GSR Holdings LLC. Defendant's Reply in Support of It's Motion to Stay This Matter (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 7, # 2 Exhibit 8, # 3 Exhibit 9, # 4 Exhibit 10, # 5 Exhibit 11, # 6 Exhibit 12, # 7 Exhibit 13, # 8 Exhibit 14, # 9 Exhibit 15, # 10 Exhibit 16, # 11 Exhibit 17, # 12 Exhibit 18)(Campbell, Richard) [Transferred from Nevada on 1/3/2012.] (Entered: 10/26/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER ON [30/32] STIPULATION/CORRECTED IMAGE 27 First MOTION to Stay This Matter. Replies due by 10/26/2011. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 10/20/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EM) [Transferred from Nevada on 1/3/2012.] (Entered: 10/20/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/20/2011, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re 30 Stipulation by Defendant MEI-GSR Holdings LLC. (Service of corrected image is attached). (Campbell, Richard) [Transferred from Nevada on 1/3/2012.] (Entered: 10/20/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/20/2011, Entered: None
                      NOTICE: Attorney Action Required to 30 Stipulation. Attorney RICHARD G. CAMPBELL, JR. advised to file a Notice of Corrected Image/Document event under the Notices category and link to 30 Stipulation; STIPULATION is missing signatures for both counsel. (no image attached)(BLG) [Transferred from Nevada on 1/3/2012.] (Entered: 10/20/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/19/2011, Entered: None
                        STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) FOR DEFENDANT TO FILE A REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO STAY THIS MATTER by Defendant MEI-GSR Holdings LLC. (Campbell, Richard) [Transferred from Nevada on 1/3/2012.] (Entered: 10/19/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None
                          RESPONSE to 27 First MOTION to Stay This Matter, filed by Plaintiff Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC. Replies due by 10/21/2011. (Rounds, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 1/3/2012.] (Entered: 10/11/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                            MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb, on 9/29/2011. The Scheduling Conference set for September 29, 2011 at 10:00 a.m. is hereby VACATED. No discovery Plan and Scheduling Order will be entered until after disposition of Defendant MEI-GSR's # 27 Motion to Stay by the Hon. Larry R. Hicks. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) [Transferred from Nevada on 1/3/2012.] (Entered: 09/29/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: None
                              First MOTION to Stay This Matter by Defendant MEI-GSR Holdings LLC. Motion ripe 9/27/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Campbell, Richard) [Transferred from Nevada on 1/3/2012.] (Entered: 09/27/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None
                                Mail Returned as Undeliverable ("RTS-No Such Number-UTF") re 24 Minute Order Setting Hearing, addressed to Adam Alper Kirkland & Ellis, LLP, 55 California Street, San Francisco, CA 94104. (PM) [Transferred from Nevada on 1/3/2012.] (Entered: 09/26/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/23/2011, Entered: None
                                  Mail Returned as Undeliverable (return to sender; no such number) re 22 Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice, addressed to Adam Alper @ 55 California Street, San Francisco, CA 94104. (KO) [Transferred from Nevada on 1/3/2012.] (Entered: 09/23/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb, on 9/20/2011. By Deputy Clerk: Jennifer Cotter. IT IS ORDERED that a Scheduling Conference re 18 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order is set for Thursday, 9/29/2011, at 10:00 AM in Reno Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. Counsel wishing to appear telephonically shall contact the courtroom deputy, Jennifer Cotter (775-686-5758), at least two (2) days prior to the hearing to advise her of the phone number where they may be reached at the time of the hearing. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC) [Transferred from Nevada on 1/3/2012.] (Entered: 09/20/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE from Kirkland & Ellis, LLP RE: Notice of Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1407 (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support of Motion to Transfer Part 1, # 2 Brief in Support of Motion to Transfer Part 2)(PM) [Transferred from Nevada on 1/3/2012.] (Entered: 09/15/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER APPROVING 19 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Adam Alper for MEI-GSR Holdings LLC,Adam Alper for MEI-GSR Holdings LLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel, Attorney Richard G. Campbell, Jr.. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 9/13/2011. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PM) [Transferred from Nevada on 1/3/2012.] (Entered: 09/15/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re 19 First VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Adam Alper and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Richard G. Campbell, Jr. (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 0978-2108343)First VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Adam Alper and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Richard G. Campbell, Jr. (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 0978-2108343) by Defendant MEI-GSR Holdings LLC. (Service of corrected image is attached). (Campbell, Richard) [Transferred from Nevada on 1/3/2012.] (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/8/2011, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE: Attorney Action Required to 19 First VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Adam Alper and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Richard G. Campbell, Jr. (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 0978-2108343)First VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Adam Alper and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Richard G. Campbell, Jr. (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 0978-2108343). Attorney Richard Campbell advised to complete the information provided in paragraph 9 of page 3 of their document. Please file a notice of corrected image/document and link to motion 19 in order to avoid paying the filing fee. (no image attached)(WJ) [Transferred from Nevada on 1/3/2012.] (Entered: 09/08/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/7/2011, Entered: None
                                              First VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Adam Alper and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Richard G. Campbell, Jr. (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 0978-2108343) by Defendant MEI-GSR Holdings LLC. Motion ripe 9/7/2011. (Campbell, Richard) [Transferred from Nevada on 1/3/2012.] (Entered: 09/07/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order filed by Defendant MEI-GSR Holdings LLC. (Campbell, Richard) [Transferred from Nevada on 1/3/2012.] (Entered: 09/07/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Robert C. Jones, on 9/6/2011. IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr no longer assigned to case. All further documents must bear the correct case number 3-11-cv-343-LRH-WGC. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LG) [Transferred from Nevada on 1/3/2012.] (Entered: 09/06/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                    PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiff Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC. (Rounds, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 1/3/2012.] (Entered: 08/23/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                      PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order filed by Defendant MEI-GSR Holdings LLC. (Campbell, Richard) [Transferred from Nevada on 1/3/2012.] (Entered: 08/22/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (no image attached) (DRM) [Transferred from Nevada on 1/3/2012.] (Entered: 08/05/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                          ANSWER to 8 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, filed by Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC.(Rounds, Michael) Modified on 8/5/2011 to clarify entry. (WJ). [Transferred from Nevada on 1/3/2012.] (Entered: 08/04/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ORDER ON 11 STIPULATION : Innovatio's responsive pleading to GSR's Counterclaims due by 8/4/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr on 7/28/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) [Transferred from Nevada on 1/3/2012.] (Entered: 07/29/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                              STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re 8 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, ; by Counter Defendant Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC, Plaintiff Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC. (Rounds, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 1/3/2012.] (Entered: 07/28/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by MEI-GSR Holdings LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case.. (Meich, Bret) [Transferred from Nevada on 1/3/2012.] (Entered: 07/15/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (no image attached) (PM) [Transferred from Nevada on 1/3/2012.] (Entered: 07/08/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                    ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand ( Certificate of Interested Parties due by 7/17/2011., Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 8/21/2011.), First COUNTERCLAIM against Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC filed by MEI-GSR Holdings LLC.(Campbell, Richard) [Transferred from Nevada on 1/3/2012.] (Entered: 07/07/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER ON STIPULATION GRANTING 6 Stipulation (1st Request). The parties stipulate that defendant shall have until 7/7/2011 to file a responsive pleading to plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr on 6/21/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC) [Transferred from Nevada on 1/3/2012.] (Entered: 06/21/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                        STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) FOR DEFENDANT TO FILE FIRST RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO COMPLAINT by Defendant MEI-GSR Holdings LLC. (Campbell, Richard) [Transferred from Nevada on 1/3/2012.] (Entered: 06/21/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                          CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Rounds, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 1/3/2012.] (Entered: 05/23/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                            AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2) (MLC) [Transferred from Nevada on 1/3/2012.] (Entered: 05/16/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/16/2011, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                              SUMMONS ISSUED as to MEI-GSR Holdings LLC re 1 Complaint. (MLC) [Transferred from Nevada on 1/3/2012.] (Entered: 05/16/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 10-2. Counsel Matthew G. McAndrews and Raymond P. Niro, Jr. to comply with completion and electronic filing of the Designation of Local Counsel and Verified Petition. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. Counsel is also required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of pleadings. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney(s). Verified Petition due by 6/27/2011.(no image attached) (WJ) [Transferred from Nevada on 1/3/2012.] (Entered: 05/13/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                  COMPLAINT against MEI-GSR Holdings LLC (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0978-1985904), filed by Innovatio IP Ventures, LLC. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 5/23/2011. Proof of service due by 9/10/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q1, # 18 Exhibit Q2, # 19 Civil Cover Sheet, # 20 Summons MEI-GSR Holdings LLC) (Rounds, Michael) [Transferred from Nevada on 1/3/2012.] (Entered: 05/13/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                    This case has been viewed 470 times.

                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                    Space
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                     
                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                    Need Password Help?