Depuy Spine Holding Corporation v. Medical Edge Technologies, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-10108
District Judge Joseph L. Tauro, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Depuy Spine Holding Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David C. Henderson +1 617 439 2000 +9739 973 973 9748
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph F. Shea +1 617 439 2000 +9739 973 973 9748

Toggle Switch Represented by Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky & Popeo, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/19/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Yalonda T. Howze +1 617 348 1813 +1 617 542 2241 ythowze@mintz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nutter, McClennen & Fish, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric N. Shor +1 617 439 2734 +1 617 310 9734 eshor@nutter.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rebecca L. Sipowicz +1 617 439 2416 +1 617 310 9416 rsipowicz@nutter.com
v.
No Logo Medical Edge Technologies, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Boise Cascade Wood Products Holdings Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul E. White +1 617 227 3030 +1 617 523 4001 white@srbc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Ben C. Brodhead, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ben C. Brodhead +1 404 880 3399 +1 404 880 3386 bcb@brodheadlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sugarman, Rogers, Barshak & Cohen, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carl A. Roller +1 617 227 3030 +1 617 523 4001 carl@carlroller.com
No Logo Ted Rowe, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Boise Cascade Wood Products Holdings Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul E. White +1 617 227 3030 +1 617 523 4001 white@srbc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Ben C. Brodhead, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ben C. Brodhead +1 404 880 3399 +1 404 880 3386 bcb@brodheadlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sugarman, Rogers, Barshak & Cohen, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carl A. Roller +1 617 227 3030 +1 617 523 4001 carl@carlroller.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
  Entries (68) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 11/6/2008, Entered: None
Letter/MOTION to Withdraw Pending Motions by Depuy Spine Holding Corporation, Medical Edge Technologies, Inc., Ted Rowe.(Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/10/2008)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: None
    REPLY to Response to 59 Cross MOTION to Enforce Judgment, 58 MOTION to Enforce Judgment Confirming the Award of Arbitration, 66 MOTION for Leave to File Reply filed by Depuy Spine Holding Corporation. (Sipowicz, Rebecca) (Entered: 03/24/2008)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: None
      MOTION for Leave to File Reply by Depuy Spine Holding Corporation.(Sipowicz, Rebecca) (Entered: 03/24/2008)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: None
        RESPONSE to Motion re 61 MOTION for Protective Order Enforcement filed by Medical Edge Technologies, Inc., Ted Rowe. (Brodhead, Ben) (Entered: 03/24/2008)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: None
          EXHIBIT re 63 Response to Motion, 62 Reply to Response to Motion by Medical Edge Technologies, Inc., Ted Rowe. (Brodhead, Ben) (Entered: 03/18/2008)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: None
            RESPONSE to Motion re 59 Cross MOTION to Enforce Judgment filed by Medical Edge Technologies, Inc., Ted Rowe. (Brodhead, Ben) (Entered: 03/18/2008)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: None
              REPLY to Response to 58 MOTION to Enforce Judgment Confirming the Award of Arbitration filed by Medical Edge Technologies, Inc., Ted Rowe. (Brodhead, Ben) (Entered: 03/18/2008)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: None
                MOTION for Protective Order Enforcement by Depuy Spine Holding Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A through E)(Sipowicz, Rebecca) (Entered: 03/17/2008)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/13/2008, Entered: None
                  MEMORANDUM in Support re 59 Cross MOTION to Enforce Judgment filed by Depuy Spine Holding Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Shor, Eric) (Entered: 03/13/2008)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/13/2008, Entered: None
                    Cross MOTION to Enforce Judgment by Depuy Spine Holding Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Shor, Eric) (Entered: 03/13/2008)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: None
                      MOTION to Enforce Judgment Confirming the Award of Arbitration by Medical Edge Technologies, Inc., Ted Rowe. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Brodhead, Ben) (Entered: 03/03/2008)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/12/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                        Judge Joseph L. Tauro : ORDER entered. JUDGMENT. (Abaid, Kimberly) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/12/2007 (Abaid, Kimberly). (Entered: 12/12/2007)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                          Judge Joseph L. Tauro : ORDER entered - 55 Motion to Amend Judgment is ALLOWED. The Order dated October 2, 2007 47 is VACATED. A new Judgment will issue. 48 Motion for Reconsideration, 50 Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief, and 52 Request for Hearing are MOOT. The Motion Hearing set for December 12, 2007 at 2:15 PM is CANCELED. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/11/2007)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: None
                            CORRECTED - Joint MOTION to Amend 47 Judgment by Depuy Spine Holding Corporation, Medical Edge Technologies, Inc., Ted Rowe. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Sipowicz, Rebecca) Modified on 12/12/2007 (Abaid, Kimberly). (Entered: 12/11/2007)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: None
                              Joint MOTION to Amend 47 Judgment by Depuy Spine Holding Corporation, Medical Edge Technologies, Inc., Ted Rowe. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Sipowicz, Rebecca) (Entered: 12/11/2007)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/8/2007, Entered: None
                                MOTION Defendants' Motion for Telephonic Hearing by Medical Edge Technologies, Inc., Ted Rowe.(Brodhead, Ben) (Entered: 11/08/2007)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: None
                                  MOTION for Hearing re 51 Reply in Support, 48 MOTION for Reconsideration re 46 MOTION Confirm Award of Arbitration, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, 47 Judgment by Depuy Spine Holding Corporation.(Sipowicz, Rebecca) Modified on 10/15/2007 (Abaid, Kimberly). (Entered: 10/12/2007)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: None
                                    REPLY in Support re 48 MOTION for Reconsideration re 46 MOTION Confirm Award of Arbitration, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, 47 Judgment filed by Depuy Spine Holding Corporation. (Sipowicz, Rebecca) Modified on 10/15/2007 (Abaid, Kimberly). (Entered: 10/12/2007)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: None
                                      MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief by Depuy Spine Holding Corporation.(Sipowicz, Rebecca) (Entered: 10/12/2007)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: None
                                        RESPONSE to Motion re 48 MOTION for Reconsideration re 46 MOTION Confirm Award of Arbitration, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, 47 Judgment MOTION for Reconsideration re 46 MOTION Confirm Award of Arbitration, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, 47 Judgment filed by Medical Edge Technologies, Inc., Ted Rowe. (Brodhead, Ben) (Entered: 10/10/2007)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: None
                                          MOTION for Reconsideration re 46 MOTION Confirm Award of Arbitration, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, 47 Judgment by Depuy Spine Holding Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A and B# 2 Exhibits B through D# 3 Exhibits D and E)(Sipowicz, Rebecca) Modified on 10/10/2007 (Abaid, Kimberly). (Entered: 10/09/2007)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            Judge Joseph L. Tauro : ORDER entered. (Abaid, Kimberly) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/4/2007 (Abaid, Kimberly). (Entered: 10/04/2007)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: None
                                              MOTION Confirm Award of Arbitration by Medical Edge Technologies, Inc., Ted Rowe. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Brodhead, Ben) Modified on 10/2/2007 (Abaid, Kimberly). (Entered: 10/01/2007)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca L. Sipowicz on behalf of Depuy Spine Holding Corporation (Sipowicz, Rebecca) (Entered: 09/20/2007)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Yalonda T. Howze (Howze, Yalonda) Modified on 9/20/2007 (Abaid, Kimberly). (Entered: 09/19/2007)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                    Joint Statement Letter/request (non-motion) from Yalonda T. Howze, Esq.. (Howze, Yalonda) (Entered: 06/22/2007)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/14/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      Judge Joseph L. Tauro : ORDER entered. By June 22, 2007, the Parties shall report to the court on the status of the case, noting their positions on whether the case should remain active on the court's docket.(Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 06/14/2007)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 2/22/2007 before Judge Wolf. Court Reporter: Romanow. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter or the Clerk's Office. (O'Leary, Dennis) (Entered: 02/23/2007)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/22/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          Judge Mark L. Wolf : ORDER entered denying 32 Motion for TRO (O'Leary, Dennis) (Entered: 02/22/2007)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/22/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Mark L. Wolf : Motion Hearing held on 2/22/2007 re 32 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Depuy Spine Holding Corporation,. (Court Reporter Romanow.) (O'Leary, Dennis) (Entered: 02/22/2007)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by David C. Henderson on behalf of Depuy Spine Holding Corporation (Henderson, David) (Entered: 02/22/2007)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                Supplemental Opposition re 32 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Medical Edge Technologies, Inc., Ted Rowe. (Roller, Carl) (Entered: 02/22/2007)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on February 12, 2007 before Judge Tauro. Court Reporter: Carol L. Scott. The original transcripts are maintained in the case file in the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter or the Clerk's Office. (Abaid, Kim) (Entered: 02/21/2007)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                    EXHIBIT re 32 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Exhibit # 4 - Notice of Hearing) by Depuy Spine Holding Corporation. (Howze, Yalonda) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/22/2007 (Abaid, Kim). (Entered: 02/21/2007)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                      First Opposition re 32 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by all defendants. (Brodhead, Ben) (Entered: 02/18/2007)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 32 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Depuy Spine Holding Corporation. (Howze, Yalonda) (Entered: 02/16/2007)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                          Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Depuy Spine Holding Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit February 12, 2007 Court Order# 2 Exhibit Defendants' Georgia motion# 3 Exhibit Sales Representative Agreement)(Howze, Yalonda) (Entered: 02/16/2007)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            Judge Joseph L. Tauro : ORDER entered 30 Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief is ALLOWED. 3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. An evidentiary hearing will be held after March 15, 2007, at a date to be set by the parties and Courtroom Clerk Zita Lovett. Parties shall report the status of their establishment of an arbitration schedule to Courtroom Clerk Zita Lovett by February 19, 2007. (Abaid, Kim) (Entered: 02/12/2007)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                              Assented to MOTION for Leave to File REPLY BRIEF by Depuy Spine Holding Corporation.(Shea, Joseph) (Entered: 02/11/2007)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                Reply Memorandum in Support re 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Depuy Spine Holding Corporation. (Shea, Joseph) Modified on 2/12/2007 (Abaid, Kim). (Entered: 02/11/2007)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT in Support re 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Max Reinhardt. (Howze, Yalonda) (Entered: 02/09/2007)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT in Support re 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction David Mayo - Duplicate. (Howze, Yalonda) Modified on 2/12/2007 (Abaid, Kim). (Entered: 02/09/2007)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT in Support re 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Patrick Fusco. (Howze, Yalonda) (Entered: 02/09/2007)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT in Support re 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction David Mayo. (Howze, Yalonda) Modified on 2/12/2007 (Abaid, Kim). (Entered: 02/09/2007)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT in Support re 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Donald K. Lawrence. (Howze, Yalonda) (Entered: 02/09/2007)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                            Declaration of Jonathan James in Support re 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (Howze, Yalonda) Modified on 2/12/2007 (Abaid, Kim). (Entered: 02/09/2007)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Dr. Todd Smith in Opposition re 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by all defendants. (White, Paul) (Entered: 02/09/2007)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Dr. John Rhee in Opposition re 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by all defendants. (White, Paul) (Entered: 02/09/2007)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Dr. Keith Osborn in Opposition re 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by all defendants. (White, Paul) (Entered: 02/09/2007)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Dr. Ali Mortazavi in Opposition re 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by all defendants. (White, Paul) (Entered: 02/09/2007)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Dr. Ki Lin in Opposition re 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by all defendants. (White, Paul) (Entered: 02/09/2007)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Dr. Regis W. Haid in Opposition re 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by all defendants. (White, Paul) (Entered: 02/09/2007)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Dr. Gary Gropper in Opposition re 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by all defendants. (White, Paul) (Entered: 02/09/2007)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Dr. Christopher Clare in Opposition re 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by all defendants. (White, Paul) (Entered: 02/09/2007)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Medical Edge Technologies, Inc., Ted Rowe.(White, Paul) (Entered: 02/08/2007)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Opposition re 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Motion for Declaratory Judgment filed by all defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit Exhibit E# 6 Affidavit Cordover Affidavit# 7 Affidavit Devito Affidavit# 8 Affidavit Edwards Affidavit and Exhibits# 9 Affidavit Heller Affidavit# 10 Affidavit Plas James Affidavit# 11 Affidavit Rowe Affidavit# 12 Affidavit Steve James Affidavit)(White, Paul) (Entered: 02/08/2007)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Ben C. Brodhead Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1400937. by Medical Edge Technologies, Inc., Ted Rowe.(White, Paul) (Entered: 02/07/2007)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Emergency MOTION to Expedite Discovery (Limited to Production of Documents) in Advance of a Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Medical Edge Technologies, Inc., Ted Rowe. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3)(White, Paul) (Entered: 02/07/2007)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Depuy Spine Holding Corporation re 9 Affidavit in Support,. (Shea, Joseph) (Entered: 02/05/2007)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT in Support re 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EX. A (GEORGIA COMPLAINT) - PART 1# 2 Exhibit EX. A (GEORGIA COMPLAINT) - PART 2# 3 Exhibit EX. A (GEORGIA COMPLAINT) - PART 3# 4 Exhibit EX. A (GEORGIA COMPLAINT) - PART 4# 5 Exhibit EX. A (GEORGIA COMPLAINT) - PART 5# 6 Exhibit EX. A (GEORGIA COMPLAINT) - PART 6# 7 Exhibit EX. A (GEORGIA COMPLAINT) - PART 7)(Shea, Joseph) (Entered: 02/05/2007)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Carl A. Roller on behalf of Medical Edge Technologies, Inc., Ted Rowe (Roller, Carl) (Entered: 02/05/2007)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Paul E. White on behalf of Medical Edge Technologies, Inc., Ted Rowe (White, Paul) (Entered: 02/05/2007)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed Medical Edge Technologies, Inc. served on 1/24/2007, answer due 2/13/2007; Ted Rowe served on 1/24/2007, answer due 2/13/2007. (Howze, Yalonda) (Entered: 02/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Depuy Spine Holding Corporation. (Howze, Yalonda) (Entered: 01/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Depuy Spine Holding Corporation. (Howze, Yalonda) (Entered: 01/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Depuy Spine Holding Corporation.(Howze, Yalonda) (Entered: 01/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Max Reinhardt by Depuy Spine Holding Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Errata C# 4 Exhibit D)(Patch, Christine) (Entered: 01/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against Medical Edge Technologies, Inc., Ted Rowe , filed by Depuy Spine Holding Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Patch, Christine) (Entered: 01/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 384 times.

                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?