Engstrom v. Advanced Cell Technology, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-10135
District Judge Rya W. Zobel, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Gunnar Engstrom, Plaintiff

Represented by Mirick, O'Connell, DeMallie & Lougee, LLP

v.
No Logo Advanced Cell Technology, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Alan Anderson +1 317 663 3667 +1 317 843 5369 andersonlawassoc@sbcglobal.net
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 9 Filed: 10/26/2007, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Advanced Cell Technology, Inc.. (Anderson, David) (Entered: 10/26/2007)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/3/2007, Entered: None
    JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference. (Anderson, David) (Entered: 04/03/2007)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/30/2007, Entered: None
      MOTION for Extension of Time to April 2, 2007 to File Local Rule 16.1 Statement by Advanced Cell Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Local Rule 16.1 Statement of Defendant Advanced Cell Technology, Inc.)(Anderson, David) (Entered: 03/30/2007)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: None
        Assented to MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference by Advanced Cell Technology, Inc..(Anderson, David) (Entered: 02/12/2007)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 5 Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: None
          STATE COURT Record. (Anderson, David) (Entered: 02/05/2007)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
            NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 3/1/2007 03:00 PM in Courtroom 12 before Judge Rya W. Zobel. (Urso, Lisa) (Entered: 02/01/2007)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: None
              ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Advanced Cell Technology, Inc., Advanced Cell Technology, Inc.. (Anderson, David) (Entered: 01/30/2007)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/25/2007, Entered: None
                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Advanced Cell Technology, Inc.. (Anderson, David) (Entered: 01/25/2007)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/25/2007, Entered: None
                  NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Advanced Cell Technology, Inc. from Worcester County Superior Court, case number 06-2538B. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 1382836) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, State Court Complaint# 2 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal# 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Anderson, David) (Entered: 01/25/2007)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 126 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?