United States ex rel v. Pfizer, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-10288
District Judge Richard G. Stearns, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 7, 2019 at 3:34 AM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Bernard Lisitza, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Behn & Wyetzner, Chartered

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael I Behn +1 312 629 0000 +1 312 327 0266 mbehn@behnwyetzner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gwyneth M. Troyer +1 312 629 0000 +1 312 327 0266 gtroyer@behnwyetzner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Linda Wyetzner +1 312 327 0266 lwyetzner@behnwyetzner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jack Mikels & Associates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Milton +1 212 353 9587 +1 212 674 4614 dmilton@gis.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Brian P Kenney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian P Kenney +1 215 569 8840

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Howard Friedman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Howard Friedman +1 617 742 4100 +1 617 742 5858 hfriedman@civil-rights-law.com
District of Columbia District of Columbia, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Brian P Kenney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian P Kenney +1 215 569 8840

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Howard Friedman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Howard Friedman +1 617 742 4100 +1 617 742 5858 hfriedman@civil-rights-law.com
No Logo State of California, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Brian P Kenney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian P Kenney +1 215 569 8840

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Howard Friedman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Howard Friedman +1 617 742 4100 +1 617 742 5858 hfriedman@civil-rights-law.com
No Logo State of Delaware, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Brian P Kenney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian P Kenney +1 215 569 8840

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Howard Friedman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Howard Friedman +1 617 742 4100 +1 617 742 5858 hfriedman@civil-rights-law.com
No Logo STATE OF FLORIDA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Brian P Kenney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian P Kenney +1 215 569 8840

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Howard Friedman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Howard Friedman +1 617 742 4100 +1 617 742 5858 hfriedman@civil-rights-law.com
No Logo State of Hawaii, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Brian P Kenney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian P Kenney +1 215 569 8840

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Howard Friedman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Howard Friedman +1 617 742 4100 +1 617 742 5858 hfriedman@civil-rights-law.com
No Logo State of Illinois, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Brian P Kenney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian P Kenney +1 215 569 8840

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Howard Friedman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Howard Friedman +1 617 742 4100 +1 617 742 5858 hfriedman@civil-rights-law.com
No Logo State of Louisiana, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Brian P Kenney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian P Kenney +1 215 569 8840

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Howard Friedman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Howard Friedman +1 617 742 4100 +1 617 742 5858 hfriedman@civil-rights-law.com
No Logo State of Massachuestts, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Brian P Kenney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian P Kenney +1 215 569 8840

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Howard Friedman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Howard Friedman +1 617 742 4100 +1 617 742 5858 hfriedman@civil-rights-law.com
No Logo State of Nevada, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Brian P Kenney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian P Kenney +1 215 569 8840

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Howard Friedman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Howard Friedman +1 617 742 4100 +1 617 742 5858 hfriedman@civil-rights-law.com
No Logo State of Tennessee, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Brian P Kenney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian P Kenney +1 215 569 8840

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Howard Friedman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Howard Friedman +1 617 742 4100 +1 617 742 5858 hfriedman@civil-rights-law.com
No Logo State of Texas, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Brian P Kenney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian P Kenney +1 215 569 8840

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Howard Friedman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Howard Friedman +1 617 742 4100 +1 617 742 5858 hfriedman@civil-rights-law.com
No Logo State of Virginia, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Brian P Kenney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian P Kenney +1 215 569 8840

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Howard Friedman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Howard Friedman +1 617 742 4100 +1 617 742 5858 hfriedman@civil-rights-law.com
United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christine J. Wichers +1 617 248 5000 +1 617 248 4000

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregg D. Shapiro +1 617 748 3366 gregg.shapiro@usdoj.gov
v.
Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "Bristol Myers Squibb Co."

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mitchell J. Lazris
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer A. Walker +1 443 388 2884 Jennyannwalker4@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan & Hartson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicholas G. Stavlas
No Logo Janssen LP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark D. Seltzer , +1 617 523 2700 +1 617 523 6850 mseltzer@hklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua H. Orr +1 617 345 1000 +1 617 345 1300 jorr@nixonpeabody.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa B. Tearney +1 617 345 1323 +1 617 345 1300 mtearney@nixonpeabody.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Patterson, Belknap, Webb & Tyler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rosanne E. Felicello +1 212 336 2944 +1 212 336 7901 rfelicello@pbwt.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew David Schau +1 212 336 2000 +1 212 336 2222 adschau@pbwt.com
Johnson & Johnson, Inc. Johnson & Johnson, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Johnson & Johnson"
Unknown Role, Immunicon Corp
Unknown Role, Nevro Corp
Unknown Role, Inno-tech, Inc.
Unknown Role, Biopsys Medical, Inc.
Unknown Role, De Puy, Inc.
Unknown Role, Femrx, Inc.
Unknown Role, Heartport, Inc.
Unknown Role, Orapharma, Inc.
Unknown Role, Animas Corp
Unknown Role, Provention Bio, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark D. Seltzer , +1 617 523 2700 +1 617 523 6850 mseltzer@hklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua H. Orr +1 617 345 1000 +1 617 345 1300 jorr@nixonpeabody.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa B. Tearney +1 617 345 1323 +1 617 345 1300 mtearney@nixonpeabody.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Patterson, Belknap, Webb & Tyler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rosanne E. Felicello +1 212 336 2944 +1 212 336 7901 rfelicello@pbwt.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Miller +1 212 336 2000 cymiller@pbwt.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew David Schau +1 212 336 2000 +1 212 336 2222 adschau@pbwt.com
No Logo Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark D. Seltzer , +1 617 523 2700 +1 617 523 6850 mseltzer@hklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua H. Orr +1 617 345 1000 +1 617 345 1300 jorr@nixonpeabody.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa B. Tearney +1 617 345 1323 +1 617 345 1300 mtearney@nixonpeabody.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Patterson, Belknap, Webb & Tyler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rosanne E. Felicello +1 212 336 2944 +1 212 336 7901 rfelicello@pbwt.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew David Schau +1 212 336 2000 +1 212 336 2222 adschau@pbwt.com
Pfizer, Inc. Pfizer, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Arqule, Inc.
Unknown Role, Icagen, Inc.
Unknown Role, Zoetis Inc.
Unknown Role, Celladon Corp
Unknown Role, Pfizer Production LLC
Unknown Role, Icu Medical Inc/de
Unknown Role, Upjohn Inc
Unknown Role, Insite Vision, Inc.
Unknown Role, pSivida LTD
Unknown Role, Cortexyme, Inc.
Unknown Role, Imara Inc.
Unknown Role, Bioatla, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Alston & Bird, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tiffany A. Buxton +1 212 210 9448 +1 212 210 9444 tiffany.buxton@alston.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander S. Lorenzo +1 212 210 9400 +1 212 210 9444 alexander.lorenzo@alston.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert N. Driscoll +1 617 570 1000 +2278 227 227 8591
Citation Section 31 U.S.C. § 3729
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (274) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Bernard Lisitza. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Friedman, Howard) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
    Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER Approving Amendment to State Settlement, ENTERED,granting 303 Motion for Settlement (Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 03/11/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None
      MOTION for Settlement Amendment Approval by Commonwealth of Kentucky. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amendment to Settlement Agreement, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Applegate, LeeAnne) (Entered: 03/10/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
        Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered permitting Lisitza and remaining defendants to file a stipulated dismissal in this matter by March 14, 2014. SO ORDERED. (Zierk, Marsha) (Entered: 03/03/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 301 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Settlement by Bernard Lisitza (Friedman, Howard) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
            Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying 299 Motion for Extension of Time "DENIED. The plaintiff will file his motion by 3/1/14". (Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 02/06/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: None
              MOTION for Extension of Time to May 1, 2014 to file a Motion for Attorneys' Fees by Bernard Lisitza.(Friedman, Howard) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 297 Motion extend time to file motion for attorneys' fees until 3/1/14 (Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None
                  Assented to MOTION to Set Time of Filing Motion for Attorneys' Fees by Bernard Lisitza. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Friedman, Howard) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                    Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER of Dismissal, entered. copy to AUSA 11/26/13.(Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 11/26/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 295 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
                      STIPULATION of Dismissal by State of Massachusetts. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Patten, Robert) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                        Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE(Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: None
                          STIPULATION of Dismissal by United States of America. (Shapiro, Gregg) (Entered: 11/14/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                            Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 287 Motion to Stay; granting 291 Motion to Stay "Court hereby enters an Order renewing the stay of this action up to within fourteen calendar days of the date that federal appropriations are restored." (Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None
                              Joint Status Report and MOTION to Stay by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., United States of America, FILED UNDER SEAl.(Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None
                                NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. re 287 Joint MOTION to Stay ((Joint Status Report and Motion to Extend Stay) Under Seal (Seltzer, Mark) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 288 Motion for Leave to File an unredacted version of their Joint Status Report and Motion to Extend Stay [Dkt. 287] under seal.Counsel should now file the unredacted document including - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Zierk, Marsha) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None
                                    Joint MOTION for Leave to File 287 Under Seal by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Seltzer, Mark) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None
                                      Joint MOTION to Stay ((Joint Status Report and Motion to Extend Stay) by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Seltzer, Mark) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 285 Motion for Extension of Time, at the same time pointing out that this case is the oldest on this session's docket (by far) and has been stayed since June 19, 2012. As the court sees no appreciable progress since the original stay, the court expects to enter a 60-day Order of Dismissal on October 15, 2013, or move forward with the pending motions in this case. (Zierk, Marsha) (Entered: 09/03/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None
                                          Status Report and Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to 10/15/13 to extend stay by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., United States of America, FILED UNDER SEAL.(Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 09/03/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc., re 281 Joint MOTION to Stay (Joint Status Report and Motion to Extend Stay) Under Seal (Seltzer, Mark) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 282 Motion for Leave to File Motion/Status report under seal. Counsel may now file including - Leave to file granted on August 30, 2013, in the caption of the document. (Zierk, Marsha) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                Joint MOTION for Leave to File 281 Under Seal by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc.,.(Seltzer, Mark) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                  Joint MOTION to Stay (Joint Status Report and Motion to Extend Stay) by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc.,.(Seltzer, Mark) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Candice D. Hooper Withdrawal of Lelia Beck by Candice Hooper (Hooper, Candice) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered granting 274 Motion to Stay; granting 278 Motion for Extension of Time to stay until 8/30/13. (Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 07/26/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 7/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                        Joint Status Report and MOTION for Extension of Time to 8/30/13 to extend stay by Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc.,, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., United States of America, FILED UNDER SEAL.(Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 07/24/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 7/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING by Johnson & Johnson (Under Seal) re 274 Joint MOTION to Stay (Joint Status Report and Motion to Extend Stay) Under Seal (Seltzer, Mark) (Entered: 07/23/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 7/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 275 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 07/23/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                              Joint MOTION for Leave to File 274 Under Seal by Johnson & Johnson.(Seltzer, Mark) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                Joint MOTION to Stay (Joint Status Report and Motion to Extend Stay) by Johnson & Johnson.(Seltzer, Mark) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 269 Motion to extend the Stay of this case until July 22, 2013. (Zierk, Marsha) (Entered: 07/03/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING by Johnson & Johnson re 269 Joint MOTION to Stay (Joint Status Report and Motion to Extend Stay) (Under Seal) (Seltzer, Mark) (Entered: 07/03/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 270 Motion for Leave to File Motion under seal; Counsel should now file the sealed unredacted memorandum Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on July 3, 2013 - in the caption of the document. (Zierk, Marsha) (Entered: 07/03/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        Joint MOTION for Leave to File 269 Under Seal by Johnson & Johnson.(Seltzer, Mark) (Entered: 07/03/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          Joint MOTION to Stay (Joint Status Report and Motion to Extend Stay) by Johnson & Johnson.(Seltzer, Mark) (Entered: 07/03/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 4/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by William W. Thomas for Behn & Wyetzner, Chtd. (Thomas, William) (Entered: 04/11/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 4/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Stearns: Status Conference held on 4/5/2013. Parties shall file a detailed status report within 90 days (on or before July 3, 2013) unless the case settles in the interim. (Court Reporter: None)(Attorneys present: AUSA Shapiro, Oberembt (USDOJ), Friedman, by phone: Applegate, Bolton,Carcare,Deisher, Winget-Hernandez; Rauseo-Ricupero, Sarraille, Seltzer) (Seelye, Terri) (Entered: 04/05/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Status Conference set for 4/5/2013 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 21 before Judge Richard G. Stearns. (Seelye, Terri) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 3/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered finding as moot 258 Motion to Stay (Redacted version of Motion to Stay 262 ). See # 263 , 264 . (Seelye, Terri) (Entered: 03/19/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. re 263 Order on Motion for Extension of Time for stay(Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 03/06/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 262 Motion for Extension of Time to continue stay. (Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 03/06/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                        Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to extend stay by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., United States of America, FILED UNDER SEAL.(Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                          NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. re 258 Joint MOTION to Stay (Extension of Stay) Under Seal (Seltzer, Mark) (Entered: 03/04/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 259 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 03/04/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                              Joint MOTION for Leave to File 258 Under Seal by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Seltzer, Mark) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Stay (Extension of Stay) by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Seltzer, Mark) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered finding as moot 252 Motion to Stay; granting 256 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 30 days to extend stay. (Seelye, Terri) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 30 days to extend stay by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., United States of America, FILED UNDER SEAL.(Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 02/01/2013)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                      NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. re 252 Joint MOTION to Stay (Extension of Stay) Under Seal (Seltzer, Mark) (Entered: 02/01/2013)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 253 Motion for Leave to File Document: an unredacted version of their Joint Motion to Extend Stay 252 under seal. Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Seelye, Terri) (Entered: 02/01/2013)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Joint MOTION for Leave to File 252 Under Seal by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Seltzer, Mark) (Entered: 01/31/2013)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Joint MOTION to Stay (Extension of Stay) by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Seltzer, Mark) (Entered: 01/31/2013)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 12/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 250 Motion for Extension of Time to extend stay (Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 12/19/2012)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to extend stay by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., United States of America, FILED UNDER SEAL.(Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 12/18/2012)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 245 Motion to Stay; stayed is extended until February 1, 2013. (Zierk, Marsha) (Entered: 12/18/2012)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Under Seal re 245 Joint MOTION to Stay (Extension of Stay) Under Seal (Seltzer, Mark) (Entered: 12/18/2012)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 246 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 12/18/2012)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION for Leave to File 245 Under Seal by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Seltzer, Mark) (Entered: 12/18/2012)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION to Stay (Extension of Stay) by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Seltzer, Mark) (Entered: 12/18/2012)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 237 Motion to Stay (Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 11/19/2012)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 242 Motion for Extension of Time (Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 11/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to extend stay by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., United States of America, FILED UNDER SEAL.(Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 11/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Sarah E. Ragland (Ragland, Sarah) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. re 237 Joint MOTION to Stay (Extension of Stay) Under Seal (Seltzer, Mark) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 238 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Extension of Stay under seal; Counsel should now file the motion. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the motion. (Zierk, Marsha) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION for Leave to File 237 (Under Seal) by Janssen, LP, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc.,, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Seltzer, Mark) (Entered: 11/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION to Stay (Extension of Stay) by Janssen, LP, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc.,, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Seltzer, Mark) (Entered: 11/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 11/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by James J. Fauci (Fauci, James) (Entered: 11/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 10/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 230 Motion to continue Stay (Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 10/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 234 Filed: 10/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                SEALED Version of Joint Motion to Extend Stay, FILED UNDER SEAL. (Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 10/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 10/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. re 230 Joint MOTION to Stay (Extension of Stay) Under Seal (Seltzer, Mark) (Entered: 10/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 10/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 231 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 10/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION for Leave to File 230 Under Seal by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Seltzer, Mark) (Entered: 10/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Stay (Extension of Stay) by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Seltzer, Mark) (Entered: 10/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 229 Filed: 6/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          SEALED Version of Joint Motion to Stay, FILED UNDER SEAL. (Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 06/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc., re 226 Joint MOTION to Stay Under Seal (Seltzer, Mark) (Entered: 06/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 6/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION for Leave to File 226 Under Seal by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Seltzer, Mark) (Entered: 06/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 6/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Stay by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Seltzer, Mark) (Entered: 06/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Joint Motion to Adjust Deadlines Under Seal re Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion for Leave to File,,,, Joint Motion to Adjust Deadlines Filed Under Seal (Seltzer, Mark) (Entered: 06/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION for Leave to File [Dkt 223] Under Seal by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Seltzer, Mark) (Entered: 06/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION to Adjust Deadlines by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Seltzer, Mark) (Entered: 06/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 222 Filed: 5/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED Defendant's Reply In Support of It's Motion to Compel Certain Documents from Plaintiff/Intervenor Commonwealth of MA, FILED UNDER SEAL. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 05/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. re 202 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Testimony from Commonwealth of Massachusetts - Reply Filed Under Seal Per Leave Granted 5/2/12 (Seltzer, Mark) (Entered: 05/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 5/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION Hold in Abeyance Pending Motions re 215 Response to Motion, 211 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to 5/2/12 to Complete Discovery by Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc.,, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Seltzer, Mark) (Entered: 05/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 5/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel 202 Under Seal by Janssen, LP, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc..(Seltzer, Mark) (Entered: 05/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 5/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of 211 as Consolidated With Opposition to 215 by Janssen, LP, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc..(Seltzer, Mark) (Entered: 05/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 5/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by State of Massachusetts.(Ragland, Sarah) (Entered: 05/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 5/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Opposition re 202 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Testimony from Commonwealth of Massachusetts filed by State of Massachusetts. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J.1, # 11 Exhibit J.2, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Q, # 19 Exhibit R, # 20 Exhibit S, # 21 Exhibit T)(Ragland, Sarah) (Entered: 05/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 5/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion re 211 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to 5/2/12 to Complete Discovery filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Shapiro, Gregg) (Entered: 05/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Assented to MOTION to Withdraw 206 MOTION to Compel Certain Contracts from the Commonwealth of Massachusetts by Janssen, LP, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc..(Seltzer, Mark) (Entered: 04/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 213 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED Version of Motion #211, FILED UNDER SEAL. (Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Joint Motion for Extension of Time Under Seal (Seltzer, Mark) (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 4/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to 5/2/12 to Complete Discovery by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Seltzer, Mark) (Entered: 04/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 4/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Extension of Time Under Seal by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Seltzer, Mark) (Entered: 04/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 209 Filed: 4/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED MEMORANDUM in Support re 206 MOTION to Compel Certain Contracts from the Commonwealth of Massachusetts filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit, # 20 Exhibit, # 21 Exhibit, # 22 Exhibit, # 23 Exhibit, # 24 Exhibit, # 25 Exhibit)(Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 04/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 4/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Memorandum of Law in Support re 206 MOTION to Compel Certain Contracts from the Commonwealth of Massachusetts UNDER SEAL (Seltzer, Mark) (Entered: 04/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal the Memorandum of Law in Support of 206 by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Seltzer, Mark) (Entered: 04/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Compel Certain Contracts from the Commonwealth of Massachusetts by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Seltzer, Mark) (Entered: 04/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 205 Filed: 4/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED Memorandum of the Johnson and Johnson Defendants in Support of its Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Testimony from Plaintiff-Intervenor Commonwelath of MA, FILED UNDER SEAL. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Errata, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit)(Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 04/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 4/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Memorandum of Law in Support re 202 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Testimony from Commonwealth of Massachusetts Under Seal (Seltzer, Mark) (Entered: 04/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 4/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum in Support of 202 Under Seal by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Seltzer, Mark) (Entered: 04/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 4/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Testimony from Commonwealth of Massachusetts by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Seltzer, Mark) (Entered: 04/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL EXHIBITS 10, 14, 18, AND 21-22 to 199 Memorandum in Support of Motion by United States of America.(Shapiro, Gregg) Modified text on 4/17/2012 (Seelye, Terri). (Entered: 04/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EXHIBIT 27 to 199 Memorandum in Support of Motion by United States of America. (Shapiro, Gregg) Modified text on 4/12/2012 (Seelye, Terri). (Entered: 04/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 4/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re 198 MOTION to Compel Johnson & Johnson Depositions filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27 refiled due to error - see document #200, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32)(Shapiro, Gregg) Modified text on 4/12/2012 (Seelye, Terri). (Entered: 04/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 4/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Compel Johnson & Johnson Depositions by United States of America.(Shapiro, Gregg) (Entered: 04/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by John Pina, III (Pina, John) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 3/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to 182 MOTION for Protective Order filed by State of Massachusetts. (Pina, John) (Entered: 03/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 3/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of its Motion for a Protective Order by State of Massachusetts. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Ragland, Sarah) (Entered: 03/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Opposition re 182 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M)(Seltzer, Mark) (Entered: 03/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Opposition re 179 MOTION for Protective Order and/or Motion to Compel Discovery filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Shapiro, Gregg) (Entered: 02/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 2/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of CARA R. VIGLUCCI LOPEZ Filing fee: $ 50, receipt number 0101-3829981 by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Seltzer, Mark) (Entered: 02/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 2/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of H L ROGERS Filing fee: $ 50, receipt number 0101-3829977 by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Seltzer, Mark) (Entered: 02/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 2/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of SEAN C. GRIFFIN Filing fee: $ 50, receipt number 0101-3829971 by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Seltzer, Mark) (Entered: 02/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 2/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of MEGAN E. ALVAREZ Filing fee: $ 50, receipt number 0101-3829963 by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Seltzer, Mark) (Entered: 02/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendants' Memorandum of Law In Support of Its Motion for Protective Order, FILED UNDER SEAL. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit)(Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 02/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Memorandum of Law In Support of Motion of Protective Order and/or to Compel Discovery Filed Under Seal Pursuant to 2/22/12 Electronic Order (Seltzer, Mark) (Entered: 02/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for 184 Memorandum in Support of Motion,. Counsel who filed this document are requested to submit a courtesy copy of this document (or documents) to the Clerk's Office by as soon as possible. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy and reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF. (Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Margaret M. Moore by James Banigan. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Ryan, Catherine) (Entered: 02/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re 182 MOTION for Protective Order filed by State of Massachusetts. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15)(Ragland, Sarah) (Entered: 02/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine A. Ryan on behalf of James Banigan (Ryan, Catherine) (Entered: 02/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Protective Order by State of Massachusetts.(Ragland, Sarah) (Entered: 02/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by John Pina, III on behalf of State of Massachusetts (Pina, John) (Entered: 02/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support re 179 MOTION for Protective Order and/or Motion to Compel Discovery filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Seltzer, Mark) (Main Document 180 replaced on 2/15/2012) (Seelye, Terri). (Attachment 6 replaced on 2/15/2012) (Seelye, Terri). (Entered: 02/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Protective Order and/or Motion to Compel Discovery by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Seltzer, Mark) (Entered: 02/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Seltzer, Mark) (Entered: 02/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Kimberly M. Bolton by State of Massachusetts. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Kimberly M. Bolton)(Patten, Robert) (Entered: 01/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to 06/18/2012 to Complete Discovery by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Seltzer, Mark) (Entered: 01/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Commonwealth of Kentucky. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thomas, Tad) (Entered: 01/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 171 MOTION to Compel filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Henderson, George) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah E. Ragland on behalf of State of Massachusetts (Ragland, Sarah) (Entered: 11/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support re 171 MOTION to Compel filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M)(Seltzer, Mark) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Compel by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Seltzer, Mark) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Hae-Won Min Liao Filing fee: $ 50, receipt number 0101-3663663 by Janssen, LP, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc.,, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Hae-Won Min Liao)(Seltzer, Mark) (Entered: 11/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Christine J. Wichers (Wichers, Christine) (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Richard G. Stearns: Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order, ENTERED.(Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION for Protective Order and Confidentiality Agreement by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (proposed Protective Order))(Henderson, George) (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Jonathan F. Cohn (Cohn, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Melissa Celli (Celli, Melissa) (Entered: 09/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Robert Keeling Filing fee: $ 50, receipt number 0101-3562410 by Janssen, LP, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc.,, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Robert D. Keeling)(Seltzer, Mark) (Entered: 08/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick M. Klein on behalf of United States of America (Klein, Patrick) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Rosanne E. Felicello (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Felicello, Rosanne) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by George B. Henderson, III on behalf of United States of America (Henderson, George) (Entered: 07/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 6/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Mitchel T. Denham (Denham, Mitchel) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 6/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of William W. Thomas Filing fee: $ 50, receipt number 0101-3446663 by Bernard Lisitza. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Friedman, Howard) (Entered: 06/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 6/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Linda J. Stengle Filing fee: $ 50, receipt number 0101-3446640 by Bernard Lisitza. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Friedman, Howard) (Entered: 06/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Christopher Y. Miller (Miller, Christopher) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Fred A. Kelly, Jr on behalf of Janssen, LP, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc.,, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Kelly, Fred) (Entered: 05/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 5/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Friedman, Howard) (Entered: 05/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 5/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered denying 133 Motion for Reconsideration (Zierk, Marsha) (Entered: 05/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 5/5/2011, Entered: 5/5/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Janssen, LP, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc.,, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Rauseo-Ricupero, Ronaldo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 5/3/2011, Entered: 5/3/2011 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Richard G. Stearns: Case Management and Scheduling Order entered. Fact discovery will close on February 17, 2012; expert discovery will close on July 31, 2012; and summary judgment motions are due on or before September 28, 2012, as set out in the attached Order.(Zierk, Marsha)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 5/3/2011, Entered: 5/3/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINT SUBMISSION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 Proposed Case Management and Discovery Order by Janssen, LP, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc.,, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Rauseo-Ricupero, Ronaldo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 4/26/2011, Entered: 4/26/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 Commonwealth of Virginia. (Hooper, Candice)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: 4/18/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 of the State of California. (Franklin, Siobhan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: 4/18/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 for the Commonwealth of Kentucky. (Applegate, LeeAnne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 4/5/2011, Entered: 4/5/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to [133] MOTION for Reconsideration re [130] Order on Motion to Dismiss,,, MOTION for Reconsideration re [130] Order on Motion to Dismiss,,, filed by Janssen, LP, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc.,, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Rauseo-Ricupero, Ronaldo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 4/1/2011, Entered: 4/1/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Opposition re [145] MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Further Support of Motion for Partial Reconsideration filed by Bernard Lisitza. (Friedman, Howard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 4/1/2011, Entered: 4/1/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Further Support of Motion for Partial Reconsideration by Janssen, LP, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc.,, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Rauseo-Ricupero, Ronaldo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 3/29/2011, Entered: 3/29/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Laurie A. Oberembt on behalf of United States of America (Oberembt, Laurie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 3/25/2011, Entered: 3/25/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Shapiro, Gregg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 3/24/2011, Entered: 3/24/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Opposition re [133] MOTION for Reconsideration re [130] Order on Motion to Dismiss,,, MOTION for Reconsideration re [130] Order on Motion to Dismiss,,, Joint Statement by Plaintiff States filed by State of Massachusetts. (Celli, Melissa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 3/24/2011, Entered: 3/24/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Opposition re [133] MOTION for Reconsideration re [130] Order on Motion to Dismiss,,, MOTION for Reconsideration re [130] Order on Motion to Dismiss,,, filed by United States of America. (Shapiro, Gregg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 3/24/2011, Entered: 3/24/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Opposition re [133] MOTION for Reconsideration re [130] Order on Motion to Dismiss,,, MOTION for Reconsideration re [130] Order on Motion to Dismiss,,, filed by Bernard Lisitza. (Friedman, Howard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: 3/18/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to [101] Complaint, by Janssen, LP, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc.,, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Rauseo-Ricupero, Ronaldo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: 3/18/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to [93] Intervenor Complaint by Janssen, LP, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc.,, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Rauseo-Ricupero, Ronaldo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: 3/18/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to [100] Amended Complaint by Janssen, LP, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc.,, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Rauseo-Ricupero, Ronaldo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: 3/18/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to [81] Complaint,,,, by Janssen, LP, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc.,, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Rauseo-Ricupero, Ronaldo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: 3/11/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINT SUBMISSION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 Proposed Discovery Order by Janssen, LP, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc.,, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Rauseo-Ricupero, Ronaldo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: 3/11/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 3/18/2011 to File Answer by Janssen, LP, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc.,, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Rauseo-Ricupero, Ronaldo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 3/10/2011, Entered: 3/10/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Reconsideration re [130] Order on Motion to Dismiss,,, by Janssen, LP, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc.,, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Rauseo-Ricupero, Ronaldo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: 3/1/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Andrew D. Schau (Schau, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: 2/25/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Ronaldo Rauseo-Ricupero on behalf of Janssen, LP, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc.,, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Rauseo-Ricupero, Ronaldo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: 2/25/2011 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Richard G. Stearns: Memorandum and ORDER entered on Defendant Johnson & Johnson's Motion to Dismiss[109] Motion to Dismiss "...For the foregoing reasons, J&J's motions to dismiss are ALLOWED in part and DENIED in part. The Kammerer claims are DISMISSED in their entirety. Lisitza's claims of "best price" fraud are DISMISSED. J&J's motion to dismiss the claims brought by or asserted in the name of the State of Nevada, the State of Texas, and the State of Illinois is ALLOWED. J&J's motion to dismiss the claims of the State of Indiana is ALLOWED as to Count 8 and otherwise DENIED. J&J's motion to dismiss the claims of the Commonwealth of Kentucky and the Commonwealth of Virginia is DENIED. The parties will file within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order a joint proposed order regulating the future course of discovery in this matter." (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 2/23/2011, Entered: 2/23/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Conor S. Harris on behalf of Janssen, LP, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc.,, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Harris, Conor)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 2/23/2011, Entered: 2/23/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Melissa B. Tearney (Tearney, Melissa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: 12/1/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Commonwealth of Kentucky. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Thomas, Tad)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: 10/8/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, a copy of which is attached to this entry. (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: 10/8/2010 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Transcript of Motion Hearing held on October 7, 2010, before Judge Richard G. Stearns. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Debra Joyce at joycedebra@gmail.com Redaction Request due 10/29/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/8/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/6/2011. (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: 9/24/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Joshua H. Orr (Orr, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: 9/24/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of LeeAnne Applegate by State of Massachusetts. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of LeeAnne Applegate)(Patten, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: 9/7/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to [109] MOTION to Dismiss Complaints of the United States, the Relator, and the Intervenor States filed by Janssen, LP, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc.,, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Orr, Joshua) (Main Document 122 replaced on 9/8/2010) (Flaherty, Elaine).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 9/2/2010, Entered: 9/2/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Amicus Curiae Brief by Biotechnology Industry Organization, Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Freedman, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 8/26/2010, Entered: 8/26/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Gwyneth M. Troyer (Troyer, Gwyneth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 8/10/2010, Entered: 8/10/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Further Support of Motion to Dismiss (Unopposed) by Janssen, LP, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc.,, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Seltzer, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: 8/6/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Opposition re [109] MOTION to Dismiss Complaints of the United States, the Relator, and the Intervenor States on behalf of California, Indiana, Kentucky, Massachusetts and Virginia filed by State of Virginia. (Hooper, Candice)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: 8/6/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Opposition re [109] MOTION to Dismiss Complaints of the United States, the Relator, and the Intervenor States filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Shapiro, Gregg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: 8/6/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE pursuant to LR 5.2 by Bernard Lisitza re [115] Opposition to Motion to Dismiss the Plaintiffs' Complaints. (Friedman, Howard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: 8/6/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Opposition re [109] MOTION to Dismiss Complaints of the United States, the Relator, and the Intervenor States filed by Bernard Lisitza. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Friedman, Howard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 8/4/2010, Entered: 8/4/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Document(s) submitted by United States of America. Document received: Proposed Order. (Shapiro, Gregg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 8/4/2010, Entered: 8/4/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by United States of America.(Shapiro, Gregg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 6/16/2010, Entered: 6/16/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMICUS BRIEF filed by Biotechnology Industry Organization, Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America (Leave to file granted on June 16, 2010). (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibits 1-3 to Brief Of Amicus Curiae Pharmaceutical Research And Manufacturers Of America And Biotechnology Industry Organization In Support Of Johnson & Johnson Defendants Motion To Dismiss)(Freedman, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: 6/15/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Opposition re [106] MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Shapiro, Gregg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: 6/7/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re [109] MOTION to Dismiss Complaints of the United States, the Relator, and the Intervenor States filed by Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Part I, # (5) Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Part II, # (6) Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Part I, # (7) Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Part II, # (8) Exhibit Exhibit 6, # (9) Exhibit Exhibit 7)(Orr, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: 6/7/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss Complaints of the United States, the Relator, and the Intervenor States by Johnson & Johnson.(Orr, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: 6/7/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of David D. Fauvre Filing fee: $ 50, receipt number 0101-2936218 by Biotechnology Industry Organization, Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate in Support of Application For Admission Pro Hac Vice of David D. Fauvre)(Freedman, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: 6/7/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jeffrey L. Handwerker Filing fee: $ 50, receipt number 0101-2936203 by Biotechnology Industry Organization, Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate in Support of Application For Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jeffrey L. Handwerker)(Freedman, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: 6/7/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by Biotechnology Industry Organization, Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order, # (2) Brief Of Amicus Curiae Pharmaceutical Research And Manufacturers Of America And Biotechnology Industry Organization In Support Of Johnson & Johnson Defendants Motion To Dismiss, # (3) Exhibits 1-3 to Brief Of Amicus Curiae Pharmaceutical Research And Manufacturers Of America And Biotechnology Industry Organization In Support Of Johnson & Johnson Defendants Motion To Dismiss)(Freedman, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: 6/7/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by John A. Freedman on behalf of Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America, Biotechnology Industry Organization (Freedman, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 6/3/2010, Entered: 6/3/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of MITCHEL T. DENHAM by State of Massachusetts. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Celli, Melissa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 6/3/2010, Entered: 6/3/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to August 6, 2010 to File Response/Reply to the Johnson & Johnson Defendants Motion to Dismiss, Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages inthe Johnson & Johnson Defendants Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss ( Responses due by 6/17/2010) by Johnson & Johnson.(Orr, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: 5/18/2010 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. re [98] granting MOTION to Intervene filed on behalf of the State of Indiana filed by State of Virginia (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: 5/17/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT of the States of California and Indiana and the Commonwealths of Kentucky and Virginia against All Defendants (Fee Status: Local Government), filed by State of Virginia. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibits A-1 through A-4, # (2) Exhibit Exhibits B-1 through B-4)(Hooper, Candice)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: 5/17/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., filed by Bernard Lisitza.(Friedman, Howard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: 5/14/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re [98] MOTION to Intervene filed on behalf of the State of Indiana filed by State of Virginia. (Beck, Lelia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: 5/14/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Intervene filed on behalf of the State of Indiana by State of Virginia. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Beck, Lelia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: 5/13/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Siobhan A. Franklin by State of California. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit)(Seelye, Terri)(Filing fee paid in case 05cv11518)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: 5/13/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Lawrence J. Carcare II by State of Indiana. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit)(Seelye, Terri)(Filing fee paid in case 05cv11518)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: 5/13/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Intervention by State of California. (Seelye, Terri)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: 5/11/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint by Bernard Lisitza. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Friedman, Howard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: 5/10/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Intervenor COMPLAINT, filed by State of Massachusetts. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Celli, Melissa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: 4/16/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support re [91] MOTION to Intervene filed by Commonwealth of Kentucky. (Riley, Sean)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: 4/16/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Intervene by Commonwealth of Kentucky.(Riley, Sean)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: 4/16/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Sean J. Riley on behalf of Commonwealth of Kentucky (Riley, Sean)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: 3/23/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Gordon Todd, Jonathan Cohn, Mark Hopson and Bill Sarraille Filing fee: $ 200, receipt number 0101-2833740 by Janssen, LP, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc.,, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Gordon D. Todd, # (2) Affidavit of Jonathan F. Cohn, # (3) Affidavit of Mark D. Hopson, # (4) Affidavit of William A. Sarraille)(Orr, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 3/18/2010, Entered: 3/18/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 21 days after the final intervenor complaint or relator amended complaint is filed to file a consolidated response to all complaints by Johnson & Johnson, Janssen, LP, Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc.,.(Orr, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 3/18/2010, Entered: 3/18/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Lelia P. Beck (for Virginia) and Candice D. Hooper (for Virginia) by State of Massachusetts. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Affidavits of Lelia P. Beck and Candice D. Hooper)(Celli, Melissa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 3/18/2010, Entered: 3/18/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of intervention of the Office of Atty General of the Commonwealth of Virginia (Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 3/11/2010, Entered: 3/11/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Robert P Patten on behalf of State of Massachusetts (Patten, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 3/11/2010, Entered: 3/11/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Celli on behalf of State of Massachusetts (Celli, Melissa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 3/10/2010, Entered: 3/10/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by State of Massachusetts of Intervention. (Celli, Melissa) Modified text on 3/11/2010 (Seelye, Terri).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 1/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Johnson & Johnson Health Care Systems, Inc. waiver sent on 1/19/2010, answer due 3/22/2010; Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 1/19/2010, answer due 3/22/2010; Johnson & Johnson waiver sent on 1/19/2010, answer due 3/22/2010. (Shapiro, Gregg) (Entered: 01/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 81 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against Johnson & Johnson, Janssen, LP, Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc.,, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit 33, # 34 Exhibit 34, # 35 Exhibit 35, # 36 Exhibit 36, # 37 Exhibit 37, # 38 Exhibit 38, # 39 Exhibit 39, # 40 Exhibit 40, # 41 Exhibit 41, # 42 Exhibit 42, # 43 Exhibit 43, # 44 Exhibit 44, # 45 Exhibit 45, # 46 Errata 46, # 47 Exhibit 47, # 48 Exhibit 48, # 49 Exhibit 49, # 50 Exhibit 50, # 51 Exhibit 51, # 52 Exhibit 52, # 53 Exhibit 53, # 54 Exhibit 54, # 55 Exhibit 55)(Shapiro, Gregg) (Entered: 01/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 12/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Opposition to David Kammerer's Request (in case #05cv11518 #81) to File a Third Brief by Bernard Lisitza.(Friedman, Howard) Modified text & to term motion on 12/18/2009 (Seelye, Terri). (Entered: 12/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 12/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Document(s) submitted by United States of America. Document received: Proposed Order. (Shapiro, Gregg) (Entered: 12/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 12/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 77 MOTION to Intervene against Johnson & Johnson filed by United States of America. (Shapiro, Gregg) (Entered: 12/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 12/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Intervene against Johnson & Johnson by United States of America.(Shapiro, Gregg) (Entered: 12/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Christine J. Wichers on behalf of United States of America (Wichers, Christine) (Entered: 12/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 12/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to Motion re 73 MOTION to Consolidate Oral Argument by Joint Plaintiff-Relators filed by Johnson & Johnson, Janssen, LP, Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc.,. (Orr, Joshua) (Entered: 12/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re 73 MOTION to Consolidate Oral Argument by Joint Plaintiff-Relators filed by Bernard Lisitza. (Friedman, Howard) (Entered: 12/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 12/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Consolidate Oral Argument by Joint Plaintiff-Relators by Bernard Lisitza.(Friedman, Howard) (Entered: 12/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to 51 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaints (Reply to David Kammerer's Opposition Memorandum) filed by Bernard Lisitza. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Friedman, Howard) (Entered: 11/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 11/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUR-REPLY to Motion re 51 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaints filed by Johnson & Johnson, Janssen, LP, Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc.,. (Orr, Joshua) (Entered: 11/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to unseal 63 memorandum in opposition, order of 10/21/04 filed in USDC Pennsylvania case and order of 10/1/04 in USDC Illnois case (both cases transferred to USDC MA) by Bernard Lisitza.(Flaherty, Elaine) Modified text & to unseal per order of 11/20/00 on 11/23/2009 (Seelye, Terri). (Entered: 11/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Bernard Lisitza.(Friedman, Howard) (Entered: 11/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION for Leave to File Additional Papers by Johnson & Johnson, Janssen, LP, Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc.,, Bernard Lisitza.(Orr, Joshua) (Entered: 11/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Mark D. Seltzer on behalf of Johnson & Johnson, Janssen, LP, Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc., (Seltzer, Mark) (Entered: 11/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua H. Orr on behalf of Johnson & Johnson, Janssen, LP, Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc., (Orr, Joshua) (Entered: 11/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa B. Tearney on behalf of Johnson & Johnson, Janssen, LP, Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc., (Tearney, Melissa) (Entered: 11/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 51 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaints filed by Bernard Lisitza. (Attachments: # 1 exhibits)(Flaherty, Elaine) Modified to unseal document per order of 11/20/09 on 11/23/2009 (Seelye, Terri). (Entered: 11/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal, Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 11/4/09 to File Response/Reply as to 51 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaints ( Responses due by 11/17/2009) by Bernard Lisitza.(Friedman, Howard) (Entered: 11/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by United States of America Regarding Decision by the United States on Intervention (Shapiro, Gregg) (Entered: 11/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Bernard Lisitza.(Friedman, Howard) (Entered: 10/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/28/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER of Dismissal of Claims against Pfizer entered. (Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 10/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/28/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER of Dismissal as to Claims Against Bristil Myers Squibb Co entered. (Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 10/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Claims Against Bristol-Myers Squibb Company by Bernard Lisitza. (Friedman, Howard) (Entered: 09/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Claims Against Pfizer, Inc. by Bernard Lisitza. (Friedman, Howard) (Entered: 09/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to November 3, 2009 to to Respond to Defendant Johnson & Johnson's Motion to Dismiss by Bernard Lisitza.(Friedman, Howard) (Entered: 08/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to September 8, 2009 to File Response/Reply as to 46 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, 49 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint by Bernard Lisitza.(Friedman, Howard) (Entered: 08/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT in Support re 51 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaints (Declaration of Daniel Ruzumna) filed by Johnson & Johnson, Janssen, LP, Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3 Part 1, # 4 Exhibit 3 Part 2, # 5 Exhibit 4 Part 1, # 6 Exhibit 4 Part 2, # 7 Exhibit 5 Part 1, # 8 Exhibit 5 Part 2, # 9 Exhibit 6 Part 1, # 10 Exhibit 6 Part 2, # 11 Exhibit 7)(Schau, Andrew) (Entered: 07/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re 51 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaints filed by Johnson & Johnson, Janssen, LP, Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc.,. (Schau, Andrew) (Entered: 07/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/6/2009, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaints by Johnson & Johnson, Janssen, LP, Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc.,.(Schau, Andrew) (Entered: 07/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re 49 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Bristol Myers Squibb Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Walker, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/3/2009, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint by Bristol Myers Squibb Co..(Walker, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION re 46 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, 47 Memorandum in Support of Motion of Nelson Boxer by Pfizer, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Driscoll, Robert) (Entered: 07/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re 46 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by Pfizer, Inc.,. (Driscoll, Robert) (Entered: 07/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/2/2009, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Pfizer, Inc.,.(Driscoll, Robert) (Entered: 07/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Assented to MOTION to Allow the United States to File a Statement of Interest on or Before September 3, 2009 by Johnson & Johnson, Janssen, LP, Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc.,.(Felicello, Rosanne) (Entered: 07/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (Motion on Consent to File One Consolidated Motion and to Increase the Page Limit of Johnson & Johnson's Memorandum of Law in Support of its Motion to Dismiss by Janssen, LP, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc.,.(Felicello, Rosanne) (Entered: 06/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Bristol Myers Squibb Co..(Walker, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Nelson A. Boxer, Tiffany A. Buxton, Alexander S. Lorenzo Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 01010000000002484744. by Pfizer, Inc.,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Nelson Boxer Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Exhibit Tiffany Buxton Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Exhibit Alexander Lorenzo Certificate of Good Standing, # 4 Exhibit Local Rule 83.5.3(b) Certification)(Driscoll, Robert) (Entered: 06/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Pfizer, Inc.,. (Driscoll, Robert) (Entered: 06/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Robert N. Driscoll on behalf of Pfizer, Inc., (Driscoll, Robert) (Entered: 06/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Mitchell J. Lazris and Nicholas G. Stavlas by Bristol Myers Squibb Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certification of Mitchell J. Lazris, # 2 Exhibit Certification of Nicholas G. Stavlas)(Walker, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Andrew D. Schau, Daniel S. Ruzumna and Christopher Y. Miller by Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Certification of Andrew D. Schau, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Certification of Daniel S. Ruzumna, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Certification of Christopher Y. Miller)(Felicello, Rosanne) (Entered: 06/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to August 4, 2009 to File Responsive Pleadings by Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc.,, Johnson & Johnson, Janssen, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of service)(Felicello, Rosanne) (Entered: 05/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc.,, Johnson & Johnson, Janssen, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of service)(Felicello, Rosanne) (Entered: 05/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Rosanne E. Felicello on behalf of Johnson & Johnson, Janssen, LP, Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc., (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of service)(Felicello, Rosanne) (Entered: 05/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bristol Myers Squibb Co.. (Walker, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer A. Walker on behalf of Bristol Myers Squibb Co. (Walker, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Court to Set a Date for Service to April 6, 2009 by Bernard Lisitza.(Friedman, Howard) (Entered: 01/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT against Pfizer, Inc.,, Bristol Myers Squibb Co., Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc.,, filed by State of Delaware, District of Columbia, State of Florida, State of Hawaii, State of Louisiana, State of Massachuestts, State of Nevada, State of Tennessee, State of Texas, State of Virginia, United States of America, Bernard Lisitza, State of Illinois, State of California. (Attachments: # 1 part two, # 2 part three, # 3 part four, # 4 part five)(Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 01/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 275 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?