Connectu, Inc. v. Facebook, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-10593-DPW
District Judge Douglas P. Woodlock, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.

Reality Check: Facebook, Inc.

This docket is featured in the January 24, 2019 article Reality Check: Facebook, Inc..

Last Updated September 25, 2017 at 9:50 PM DT (3.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Winklevoss, Cameron Howard, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Cameron Winklevoss"

Toggle Switch Represented by Boies, Schiller & Flexner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Evan A. Parke +1 202 274 1151 +1 202 237 6131 eparke@bsfllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Francis Hornick +1 202 408 4076 +1 202 408 4400 john.hornick@finnegan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by guraylaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Arthur J. Guray +1 508 620 5330 arthur@guraylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Meade & Schrag LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tyler Roberts Meade +1 510 843 3670 +1 510 843 3679 tyler@meadeschrag.com
Space Michael Lawrence Schrag , +1 510 843 3670 +1 510 843 3679 michael@meadeschrag.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sally & Fitch LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter E. Ball +1 617 542 5542 +1 617 542 1542 peb@sally-fitch.com
No Logo Connectu, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James E. Towery +1 408 287 9501

Toggle Switch Represented by Boies, Schiller & Flexner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Michael Underhill +1 202 237 2727 +1 202 274 6131 munderhill@bsfllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cornell & Gollub

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregg P. Bailey +1 617 482 8100 +1 617 482 3917 gbailey@cornellgollub.com
Space Peter M. Durney +1 617 482 8100 +1 617 482 3917 pdurney@cornellgollub.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Margaret A. Esquenet +1 202 408 4000 +1 202 408 4400 margaret.esquenet@finnegan.com
Space John Francis Hornick +1 202 408 4076 +1 202 408 4400 john.hornick@finnegan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hoge Fenton Jones & Appel, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alison Paige Buchanan +1 408 287 9501 +1 408 287 2583 apb@hogefenton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Manchel & Brennan, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott McConchie +1 617 796 8920 smcconchie@manchelbrennan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Prince, Lobel, Glovsky & Tye LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel P. Tighe +1 617 456 8000 +1 617 456 8100 dtighe@princelobel.com
No Logo Divya Narendra, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Boies, Schiller & Flexner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Evan A. Parke +1 202 274 1151 +1 202 237 6131 eparke@bsfllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Francis Hornick +1 202 408 4076 +1 202 408 4400 john.hornick@finnegan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by guraylaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Arthur J. Guray +1 508 620 5330 arthur@guraylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Meade & Schrag LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tyler Roberts Meade +1 510 843 3670 +1 510 843 3679 tyler@meadeschrag.com
Space Michael Lawrence Schrag , +1 510 843 3670 +1 510 843 3679 michael@meadeschrag.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sally & Fitch LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter E. Ball +1 617 542 5542 +1 617 542 1542 peb@sally-fitch.com
No Logo Tyler Winklevoss, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Boies, Schiller & Flexner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Evan A. Parke +1 202 274 1151 +1 202 237 6131 eparke@bsfllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Francis Hornick +1 202 408 4076 +1 202 408 4400 john.hornick@finnegan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by guraylaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Arthur J. Guray +1 508 620 5330 arthur@guraylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Meade & Schrag LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tyler Roberts Meade +1 510 843 3670 +1 510 843 3679 tyler@meadeschrag.com
Space Michael Lawrence Schrag , +1 510 843 3670 +1 510 843 3679 michael@meadeschrag.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sally & Fitch LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter E. Ball +1 617 542 5542 +1 617 542 1542 peb@sally-fitch.com
v.
No Logo Andrew McCollum, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space I. Neel Chatterjee +1 650 614 7400 +1 650 614 7401 nchatterjee@orrick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Monte M.F. Cooper mcooper@orrick.com
Space G. Hopkins Guy, III +1 650 614 7400 +1 650 614 7401 hopguy@orrick.com
Space Sean A. Lincoln +1 415 773 5700 salincoln@orrick.com
Space Theresa A. Sutton +1 650 614 7430 +1 650 614 7401 tsutton@orrick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Proskauer Rose LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Michael Bauer +1 617 526 9600 +1 617 526 9899 sbauer@proskauer.com
Space Sharada Devarasetty +1 617 526 9600 +1 617 526 9899 sdevarasetty@proskauer.com
Space Yvonne P. Greer
No Logo Christopher Hughes, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space I. Neel Chatterjee +1 650 614 7400 +1 650 614 7401 nchatterjee@orrick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Monte M.F. Cooper mcooper@orrick.com
Space G. Hopkins Guy, III +1 650 614 7400 +1 650 614 7401 hopguy@orrick.com
Space Sean A. Lincoln +1 415 773 5700 salincoln@orrick.com
Space Theresa A. Sutton +1 650 614 7430 +1 650 614 7401 tsutton@orrick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Proskauer Rose LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Michael Bauer +1 617 526 9600 +1 617 526 9899 sbauer@proskauer.com
Space Sharada Devarasetty +1 617 526 9600 +1 617 526 9899 sdevarasetty@proskauer.com
Space Yvonne P. Greer
No Logo Dustin Moskovitz, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space I. Neel Chatterjee +1 650 614 7400 +1 650 614 7401 nchatterjee@orrick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Monte M.F. Cooper mcooper@orrick.com
Space G. Hopkins Guy, III +1 650 614 7400 +1 650 614 7401 hopguy@orrick.com
Space Sean A. Lincoln +1 415 773 5700 salincoln@orrick.com
Space Theresa A. Sutton +1 650 614 7430 +1 650 614 7401 tsutton@orrick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Proskauer Rose LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Michael Bauer +1 617 526 9600 +1 617 526 9899 sbauer@proskauer.com
Space Sharada Devarasetty +1 617 526 9600 +1 617 526 9899 sdevarasetty@proskauer.com
Space Yvonne P. Greer
No Logo Eduardo Saverin, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nathan E Shafroth +1 415 772 6000 +1 415 772 6268

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space I. Neel Chatterjee +1 650 614 7400 +1 650 614 7401 nchatterjee@orrick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gordon P. Katz +1 617 573 5839 +1 617 523 6850 gordon.katz@hklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McDermott, Will & Emery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bhanu Sadasivan +1 650 324 7169 +1 650 324 6074 bsadasivan@mwe.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Annette Louise Hurst +1 415 773 4585 +1 415 773 5759 ahurst@orrick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Proskauer Rose LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Michael Bauer +1 617 526 9600 +1 617 526 9899 sbauer@proskauer.com
Facebook, Inc. Facebook, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Yvonne P. Greer

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space I. Neel Chatterjee +1 650 614 7400 +1 650 614 7401 nchatterjee@orrick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Monte M.F. Cooper mcooper@orrick.com
Space G. Hopkins Guy, III +1 650 614 7400 +1 650 614 7401 hopguy@orrick.com
Space Sean A. Lincoln +1 415 773 5700 salincoln@orrick.com
Space Theresa A. Sutton +1 650 614 7430 +1 650 614 7401 tsutton@orrick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Proskauer Rose LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Michael Bauer +1 617 526 9600 +1 617 526 9899 sbauer@proskauer.com
Space Sharada Devarasetty +1 617 526 9600 +1 617 526 9899 sdevarasetty@proskauer.com
Zuckerberg, Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Mark Elliot, Defendant
Officially listed as "Mark Zuckerberg"

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space I. Neel Chatterjee +1 650 614 7400 +1 650 614 7401 nchatterjee@orrick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Monte M.F. Cooper mcooper@orrick.com
Space G. Hopkins Guy, III +1 650 614 7400 +1 650 614 7401 hopguy@orrick.com
Space Sean A. Lincoln +1 415 773 5700 salincoln@orrick.com
Space Theresa A. Sutton +1 650 614 7430 +1 650 614 7401 tsutton@orrick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Proskauer Rose LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Michael Bauer +1 617 526 9600 +1 617 526 9899 sbauer@proskauer.com
Space Sharada Devarasetty +1 617 526 9600 +1 617 526 9899 sdevarasetty@proskauer.com
Space Yvonne P. Greer
No Logo Thefacebook LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space I. Neel Chatterjee +1 650 614 7400 +1 650 614 7401 nchatterjee@orrick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Monte M.F. Cooper mcooper@orrick.com
Space G. Hopkins Guy, III +1 650 614 7400 +1 650 614 7401 hopguy@orrick.com
Space Sean A. Lincoln +1 415 773 5700 salincoln@orrick.com
Space Theresa A. Sutton +1 650 614 7430 +1 650 614 7401 tsutton@orrick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Proskauer Rose LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Michael Bauer +1 617 526 9600 +1 617 526 9899 sbauer@proskauer.com
Space Sharada Devarasetty +1 617 526 9600 +1 617 526 9899 sdevarasetty@proskauer.com
Space Yvonne P. Greer
No Logo George C. Fisher, Special Master

Toggle Switch Represented by Harrington & Harrington

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James P. Harrington +1 617 558 7722 +1 617 527 4763 jharrington@hhmasslaw.com
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 101
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
Office Boston
Filed 3/28/2007
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Cause Section 17 U.S.C. § 101 Copyright Infringement
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated 7/22/2011
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case
Related Case
104-cv-11923-DPW
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags CLOSED,COPYRT
  Entries (483) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Remark
Binder containing In Camera documents returned to Facebook, Inc. on 04/09/2012 Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-10593-DPW, 1:04-cv-11923-DPW(York, Steve)
    LREF
    Sealed Legal Document  Remark
    Sealed documents returned to counsel on 3/30/2012 Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-10593-DPW, 1:04-cv-11923-DPW(York, Steve)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: 3/15/2012 OrderCourt Filing
      Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ENDORSED ORDER entered. Regarding the Custody of Seal Documents (York, Steve)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: 11/28/2011 Withdrawal of motion
        Withdrawal of motion: [364] MOTION Reasserting [338] MOTION Motion For Access To Pleadings and Discovery Files filed by Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, Divya Narendra, [354] MOTION to Preserve Information Needed for Rule 60(b) Motion filed by Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, Divya Narendra, [359] MOTION for Discovery Under Fed.R.Civ.P.60(B) filed by Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss, Divya Narendra.. (Meade, Tyler)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: 9/27/2011 Declaration
          DECLARATION re [376] Opposition to Motion, Originally filed as Dkt 367 by Facebook, Inc., Christopher Hughes, Andrew McCollum, Dustin Moskovitz, Eduardo Saverin, Thefacebook LLC, Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit 10, # (11) Exhibit 11)(Chatterjee, I.)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: 9/27/2011 Opposition to Motion
            Opposition re [354] MOTION to Preserve Information Needed for Rule 60(b) Motion, [359] MOTION for Discovery Under Fed.R.Civ.P.60(B) Corrected REDACTED Opposition to Replace Dkt 367 filed by Facebook, Inc., Christopher Hughes, Andrew McCollum, Dustin Moskovitz, Eduardo Saverin, Thefacebook LLC, Mark Zuckerberg. (Chatterjee, I.)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 375 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: 9/9/2011 Reply to Response to Motion
              REPLY to Response to [359] MOTION for Discovery Under Fed.R.Civ.P.60(B) filed by Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss. (Meade, Tyler)
                LREF
                Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File
                Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [374] MOTION for Leave to File A Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion For Discovery Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 60(B) by Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Lovett, Jarrett)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 9/8/2011, Entered: 9/8/2011, Terminated: 9/9/2011 Motion for Leave to File
                  MOTION for Leave to File A Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion For Discovery Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 60(B) by Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Meade, Tyler)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 9/8/2011, Entered: 9/8/2011 Response to Motion
                    RESPONSE to Motion re [364] MOTION Reasserting [338] MOTION Motion For Access To Pleadings and Discovery Files with corrected certificate of service filed by Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett, & Dunner, LLP. (Higgins, Erin)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 9/8/2011, Entered: 9/8/2011 Response to Motion
                      RESPONSE to Motion re [364] MOTION Reasserting [338] MOTION Motion For Access To Pleadings and Discovery Files filed by Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett, & Dunner, LLP. (Higgins, Erin)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Sealed Legal Document 371 Filed: 9/7/2011, Entered: 9/7/2011 Exhibit
                        Sealed Exhibit re [367] Opposition & Declaration of Monte Cooper by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 2, # (2) Exhibit 3, # (3) Exhibit 4, # (4) Exhibit 7) (York, Steve)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Sealed Legal Document 370 Filed: 9/7/2011, Entered: 9/7/2011 Opposition to Motion
                          Sealed Opposition re [367] Opposition to [354] Motion to Preserve Information Needed for Rule 60(b) [359] Motion for Discovery Under Fed.R.Civ.P.60(B) (Consolidated Opposition) filed by Facebook, Inc.. (York, Steve)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 9/7/2011, Entered: 9/7/2011 Response to Motion
                            RESPONSE to Motion re [338] MOTION Motion For Access To Pleadings And Discovery Files filed by Facebook, Inc., Andrew McCollum, Dustin Moskovitz, Eduardo Saverin, Thefacebook LLC, Mark Zuckerberg. (Chatterjee, I.)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank  Order on Motion to Seal
                              Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [366] Assented to Motion to Seal Certain Documents. (Lovett, Jarrett)
                                LREF
                                Blank 368 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: 9/2/2011 Opposition to Motion
                                Opposition re [359] MOTION for Discovery Under Fed.R.Civ.P.60(B) filed by Connectu, Inc.. (Buchanan, Alison) (Main Document 368 replaced on 9/8/2011) (York, Steve).
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 367 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: 9/2/2011 Opposition to Motion
                                  Opposition re [354] MOTION to Preserve Information Needed for Rule 60(b) Motion, [359] MOTION for Discovery Under Fed.R.Civ.P.60(B) (Consolidated Opposition) filed by Facebook, Inc., Andrew McCollum, Dustin Moskovitz, Eduardo Saverin, Thefacebook LLC, Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Declaration of Monte Cooper, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit 4, # (6) Exhibit 5, # (7) Exhibit 6, # (8) Exhibit 7, # (9) Exhibit 8, # (10) Exhibit 9, # (11) Exhibit 10, # (12) Exhibit 11)(Chatterjee, I.)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: 9/2/2011, Terminated: 9/7/2011 Motion to Seal
                                    MOTION to Seal by Facebook, Inc., Andrew McCollum, Dustin Moskovitz, Eduardo Saverin, Thefacebook LLC, Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Text of Proposed Order)(Chatterjee, I.)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank  Order
                                      Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. APPROVING [365] Stipulation, filed by Mark Zuckerberg, Andrew McCollum, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Eduardo Saverin, Dustin Moskovitz: Response to [354] MOTION to Preserve Information Needed for Rule 60(b) Motion is due by 9/2/11, and a consolidated response to said motion and [359] MOTION for Discovery Under Fed.R.Civ.P.60(B) is permitted to be filed. (Lovett, Jarrett)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 8/25/2011, Entered: 8/25/2011 Stipulation
                                        STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Enlarging Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Preserve and Permitting Defendants to File a Single Consolidated Response by Facebook, Inc., Andrew McCollum, Dustin Moskovitz, Eduardo Saverin, Thefacebook LLC, Mark Zuckerberg. (Cooper, Monte)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 8/25/2011, Entered: 8/25/2011, Terminated: 11/28/2011 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                          MOTION Reasserting [338] MOTION Motion For Access To Pleadings and Discovery Files by Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss.(Meade, Tyler)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 8/25/2011, Entered: 8/25/2011 Notice of Appearance
                                            NOTICE of Appearance by I. Neel Chatterjee on behalf of Eduardo Saverin (Chatterjee, I.)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                              Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [362] MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss. (Lovett, Jarrett)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: 8/19/2011, Terminated: 8/24/2011 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss.(Meade, Tyler)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: 8/19/2011 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                  AFFIDAVIT in Support re [359] MOTION for discovery under Rule 60(b) filed by Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit 10, # (11) Exhibit 11, # (12) Exhibit 12, # (13) Exhibit 13, # (14) Exhibit 14, # (15) Exhibit 15, # (16) Exhibit 16, # (17) Exhibit 17, # (18) Exhibit 18, # (19) Exhibit 19)(Meade, Tyler)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: 8/19/2011 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re [359] MOTION for discovery under Rule 60(b) filed by Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss. (Meade, Tyler)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: 8/19/2011, Terminated: 11/28/2011 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                      MOTION for Discovery Under Fed.R.Civ.P.60(B) by Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss.(Meade, Tyler)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: 8/16/2011 Notice (Other)
                                                        NOTICE by Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett, & Dunner, LLP Regarding Discovery Materials and Protective Orders (Higgins, Erin)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: 8/16/2011 Notice of Appearance
                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Erin K. Higgins on behalf of Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett, & Dunner, LLP (Higgins, Erin)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: 8/15/2011 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                            AFFIDAVIT in Support re [354] MOTION to Preserve Evidence Information Needed For Rule 60(b) Motion filed by Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7)(Schrag, Michael)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: 8/15/2011 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re [354] MOTION to Preserve Evidence Information Needed For Rule 60(b) Motion filed by Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss. (Schrag, Michael)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: 8/15/2011, Terminated: 11/28/2011 Motion to Preserve Evidence
                                                                MOTION to Preserve Information Needed for Rule 60(b) Motion by Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss.(Schrag, Michael)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: 7/22/2011 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
                                                                  Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ENDORSED ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASEAssociated Cases: 1:07-cv-10593-DPW, 1:04-cv-11923-DPW(York, Steve)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Blank  Terminated Case
                                                                    Civil Case Terminated. Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-10593-DPW, 1:04-cv-11923-DPW(York, Steve)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank  Order
                                                                      Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. finding as moot (347 in 1:07-cv-10593-DPW) MOTION for Joinder in Facebook Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Access to Pleadings and Discovery Files filed by Eduardo Saverin Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-10593-DPW, 1:04-cv-11923-DPW(York, Steve)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank  Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                        Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered finding as moot (348) Motion For Scheduling Order in case 1:07-cv-10593-DPW Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-10593-DPW, 1:04-cv-11923-DPW(York, Steve)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank  Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                          Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered finding as moot (338) Motion For Access To Pleadings And Discovery Files in case 1:07-cv-10593-DPW Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-10593-DPW, 1:04-cv-11923-DPW(York, Steve)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank  Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                            Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered finding as moot (324) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 1:07-cv-10593-DPW Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-10593-DPW, 1:04-cv-11923-DPW(York, Steve)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank  Order on Motion for Clarification
                                                                              Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered finding as moot (321) Motion for Clarification in case 1:07-cv-10593-DPW Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-10593-DPW, 1:04-cv-11923-DPW(York, Steve)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank  Order on Sealed Motion
                                                                                Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered finding as moot (295) Sealed Motion in case 1:07-cv-10593-DPW Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-10593-DPW, 1:04-cv-11923-DPW(York, Steve)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank  Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                  Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered finding as moot (291) Motion For Limited Relief From Stay and to Enjoin Individual Plaintiffs and Their Counsel in case 1:07-cv-10593-DPW Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-10593-DPW, 1:04-cv-11923-DPW(York, Steve)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank  Order on Sealed Motion
                                                                                    Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered finding as moot (283) Sealed Motion in case 1:07-cv-10593-DPW Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-10593-DPW, 1:04-cv-11923-DPW(York, Steve)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank  Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                      Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting (340) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:07-cv-10593-DPW Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-10593-DPW, 1:04-cv-11923-DPW(York, Steve)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 352 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: 7/21/2011 Response to Motion
                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion re [340] MOTION to Dismiss - Motion to Reassert Previous Motions to Dismiss (Docket Nos. 232, 233 and 243) MOTION to Dismiss - Motion to Reassert Previous Motions to Dismiss (Docket Nos. 232, 233 and 243) filed by Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss. (Meade, Tyler)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 351 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: 7/19/2011 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                          Sealed Opposition re [345] Opposition re [338] MOTION Motion For Access To Pleadings And Discovery Files filed by Christopher Hughes, Andrew McCollum, Dustin Moskovitz, Mark Zuckerberg. (York, Steve)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: 7/18/2011 Certificate of Service pursuant to LR 5.2
                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE pursuant to LR 5.2 by Facebook, Inc., Christopher Hughes, Andrew McCollum, Dustin Moskovitz, Mark Zuckerberg re [343] MOTION to Seal Service of Sealed Documents. (Chatterjee, I.)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Blank  Order on Motion to Seal
                                                                                              Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [343] MOTION to Seal by Christopher Hughes, Andrew McCollum, Dustin Moskovitz, Thefacebook LLC, Mark Zuckerberg. (Lovett, Jarrett)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: 7/15/2011 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re [348] MOTION Motion For Scheduling Order filed by Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss. (Meade, Tyler)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: 7/15/2011, Terminated: 7/22/2011 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                  MOTION Motion For Scheduling Order by Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss.(Meade, Tyler)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: 7/15/2011, Terminated: 7/22/2011 Motion for Joinder
                                                                                                    MOTION for Joinder in Facebook Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Access to Pleadings and Discovery Files by Eduardo Saverin.(Chatterjee, I.)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: 7/15/2011 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by I. Neel Chatterjee on behalf of Eduardo Saverin (Chatterjee, I.)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 345 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: 7/15/2011 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                        Opposition re [338] MOTION Motion For Access To Pleadings And Discovery Files filed by Facebook, Inc., Christopher Hughes, Andrew McCollum, Dustin Moskovitz, Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Declaration of Monte Cooper, # (2) Exhibit Ex. 1 to Cooper Decl., # (3) Exhibit Ex. 2 to Cooper Decl., # (4) Exhibit Ex. 3 to Cooper Decl., # (5) Exhibit Ex. 4 to Cooper Decl., # (6) Exhibit Ex. 5 to Cooper Decl., # (7) Exhibit Ex. 6 to Cooper Decl., # (8) Exhibit Ex. 7 to Cooper Decl., # (9) Exhibit Ex. 8 to Cooper Decl., # (10) Exhibit Ex. 9 to Cooper Decl., # (11) Exhibit SEALED Ex. 10 to Cooper Decl., # (12) Exhibit Ex. 11 to Cooper Decl., # (13) Exhibit Ex. 12 to Cooper Decl., # (14) Exhibit Ex. 13 to Cooper Decl.)(Chatterjee, I.) (Attachment 11 replaced on 7/19/2011) (York, Steve).
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: 7/15/2011 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                          Opposition re [338] MOTION Motion For Access To Pleadings And Discovery Files ConnectU, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Access to Pleadings and Discoverable Files filed by Connectu, Inc.. (Buchanan, Alison)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: 7/15/2011, Terminated: 7/18/2011 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                            MOTION to Seal by Christopher Hughes, Andrew McCollum, Dustin Moskovitz, Thefacebook LLC, Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Text of Proposed Order)(Chatterjee, I.)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Blank  E-Mail Notice Returned
                                                                                                              E-Mail Notice re originally issued on July 12, 2011 returned as undeliverable. Name of Addressee: James Towery. Attorney's email address removed from CM/ECF database to prevent the return of additional undeliverable email notices. (Hurley, Virginia)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank  E-Mail Notice Returned
                                                                                                                E-Mail Notice originally issued on July 12, 2011 returned as undeliverable. Name of Addressee: Yvonne Greer. Attorney's email address removed from ECF database to prevent the return of additional undeliverable email notices. (Hurley, Virginia)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank  E-Mail Notice Returned
                                                                                                                  E-Mail Notice re originally issued on July 7, 2011 returned as undeliverable. Name of Addressee: Nathan Shaforth and Annette Hurst. Email addresses for both attorneys removed from ECF database to prevent the return of additional undeliverable email notices. (Hurley, Virginia)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank  Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                    Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [342] Asented to Motion to Withdraw as Attorney re Jeremy P. Oczek. (Lovett, Jarrett)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: 7/11/2011, Terminated: 7/12/2011 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                      Assented to MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Jeremy P. Oczek by Facebook, Inc., Christopher Hughes, Andrew McCollum, Dustin Moskovitz, Thefacebook LLC, Mark Zuckerberg.(Devarasetty, Sharada)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 7/7/2011, Entered: 7/7/2011 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Sharada Devarasetty on behalf of Facebook, Inc., Christopher Hughes, Andrew McCollum, Dustin Moskovitz, Thefacebook LLC, Mark Zuckerberg (Devarasetty, Sharada)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 7/7/2011, Entered: 7/7/2011, Terminated: 7/22/2011 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss - Motion to Reassert Previous Motions to Dismiss (Docket Nos. 232, 233 and 243) by Facebook, Inc., Andrew McCollum, Dustin Moskovitz, Thefacebook LLC, Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit M. Cooper Declaration ISO Motion)(Cooper, Monte)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: 7/1/2011 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support re [338] MOTION Motion For Access To Pleadings And Discovery Files filed by Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Tyler Meade In Support of Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss and Divya Narendra's Motion For Access To Pleadings And Discovery Files, # (2) Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit 4, # (6) Exhibit 5, # (7) Exhibit 6, # (8) Exhibit 7, # (9) Exhibit 8)(Meade, Tyler)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: 7/1/2011, Terminated: 7/22/2011 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                              MOTION Motion For Access To Pleadings And Discovery Files by Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss.(Meade, Tyler)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 337 Filed: 6/23/2011, Entered: 6/23/2011 Status Report
                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT by Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8)(Meade, Tyler)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 336 Filed: 6/1/2011, Entered: 6/1/2011 Status Report
                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT by Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Meade, Tyler)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 335 Filed: 5/26/2011, Entered: 5/26/2011 Status Report
                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT And Notice of Appellate Ruling From Ninth Circuit by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Sutton, Theresa)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 334 Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: 4/20/2011 Status Report
                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT by Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Meade, Tyler)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: 4/15/2011, Terminated: 4/15/2011 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                        Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Tyler R. Meade and Michael L. Schrag Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-3364567 by Divya Narendra, Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Tyler R. Meade, Esq., # (2) Affidavit of Michael L. Schrag, Esq.)(Guray, Arthur)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                                                          Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [333] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Tyler R. Meade and Michael L. Schrag. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (York, Steve)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 4/12/2011, Entered: 4/12/2011 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Facebook, Inc., Christopher Hughes, Andrew McCollum, Dustin Moskovitz, Thefacebook LLC, Mark Zuckerberg re [274] Order on Motion to Disqualify Counsel, Order on Motion for Sanctions, Order on Motion to Stay, Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, OF APPELLATE RULING FROM NINTH CIRCUIT IN (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - CA9 Opinion)(Sutton, Theresa)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: 6/29/2010 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Robert M. Mendillo (Mendillo, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 330 Filed: 2/10/2010, Entered: 2/10/2010 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to [324] MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Connectu, Inc., Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss, Divya Narendra. (Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                  Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Electronic ORDER entered granting [329] Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Facebook, Inc.'s Response and Connectu Inc.'s Limited Opposition to Finnegan Henderson Farabow Garrett & Dunner LLP's Motion for Leave to Withdraw Appearance; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Lovett, Jarrett)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 329 Filed: 2/9/2010, Entered: 2/9/2010, Terminated: 2/10/2010 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                    Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Facebook, Inc.'s Response and Connectu Inc.'s Limited Opposition to Finnegan Henderson Farabow Garrett & Dunner LLP's Motion for Leave to Withdraw Appearance by Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss, Divya Narendra. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 328 Filed: 2/4/2010, Entered: 2/4/2010 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION re [327] Response to Motion by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E)(Cooper, Monte)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 327 Filed: 2/4/2010, Entered: 2/4/2010 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion re [324] MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Cooper, Monte)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 326 Filed: 2/4/2010, Entered: 2/4/2010 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                          Opposition re [324] MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Limited Opposition) filed by Connectu, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Bailey, Gregg)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 325 Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: 2/2/2010 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                            Letter/request (non-motion) from Robert M. Mendillo re: Arbitration Panel's Request to Review Three (3) Documents in camera. (Attachments: # (1) Letter from Sean O'Shea)(Mendillo, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 324 Filed: 1/21/2010, Entered: 1/21/2010, Terminated: 7/22/2011 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett, & Dunner, LLP. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Esquenet, Margaret)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 323 Filed: 1/21/2010, Entered: 1/21/2010 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Motion re [321] MOTION for Clarification of Order or Motion to Lift Stay to Reassert Motion to Disqualify Counsel filed by Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett, & Dunner, LLP. (Esquenet, Margaret)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 322 Filed: 1/7/2010, Entered: 1/7/2010 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re [321] MOTION for Clarification of Order or Motion to Lift Stay to Reassert Motion to Disqualify Counsel filed by Connectu, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D)(Bailey, Gregg)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 321 Filed: 1/7/2010, Entered: 1/7/2010, Terminated: 7/22/2011 Motion for Clarification
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Clarification of Order or Motion to Lift Stay to Reassert Motion to Disqualify Counsel by Connectu, Inc..(Bailey, Gregg)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 11/25/2009, Entered: 11/25/2009 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                      Facebook's Sealed Reply Memorandum in support of their [295] Motion For Limited Relief From Stay and to Enjoin Individual Plaintiffs and Their Counsel. (York, Steve)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 319 Filed: 11/25/2009, Entered: 11/25/2009 Notice of Removal
                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Withdrawal by 02138 and Request to Remove Counsel for 02138 from Service List (Ritvo, Elizabeth) Modified on 12/2/2009 (York, Steve).
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 318 Filed: 11/25/2009, Entered: 11/25/2009 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to [291] MOTION For Limited Relief From Stay and to Enjoin Individual Plaintiffs and Their Counsel filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Sutton, Theresa)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                            Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Electronic ORDER entered granting [315] Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Facebook's Reply Memorandum In Support of [291] Motion to Enjoin Plaintiffs and Their Counsel by Facebook, Inc.; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Lovett, Jarrett)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 317 Filed: 11/24/2009, Entered: 11/24/2009 Certificate of Service pursuant to LR 5.2
                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc. re [315] Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Facebook's Reply Memorandum In Support of Motion to Enjoin Plaintiffs and Their Counsel (Confidential Ex. A - Reply). (Sutton, Theresa)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 316 Filed: 11/24/2009, Entered: 11/24/2009 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION re [315] Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Facebook's Reply Memorandum In Support of Motion to Enjoin Plaintiffs and Their Counsel by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Sutton, Theresa)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 315 Filed: 11/24/2009, Entered: 11/24/2009, Terminated: 11/25/2009 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                  Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Facebook's Reply Memorandum In Support of Motion to Enjoin Plaintiffs and Their Counsel by Facebook, Inc..(Sutton, Theresa)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Order on Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Electronic ORDER entered granting [314] Assented to MOTION to Seal Facebook's Reply In Support of Motion to Enjoin by Facebook, Inc. (Lovett, Jarrett)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 314 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: 11/23/2009, Terminated: 11/24/2009 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                      Assented to MOTION to Seal Facebook's Reply In Support of Motion to Enjoin by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Sutton, Theresa)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 307 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: 11/23/2009 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Reply by Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss, Divya Narendra. (York, Steve)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 306 Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: 11/20/2009 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Laurence F. Pulgram (Pulgram, Laurence)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Order on Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Electronic ORDER entered granting [305] Sealed Motion for leave to file Reply by Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss, Divya Narendra. (Lovett, Jarrett)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 313 Filed: 11/19/2009, Entered: 11/23/2009 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Declaration of Sean F. O'Shea in further Support of [283] Motion for Limited Relief from Protective Order and in Opposition to Facebook [291] Motion to Enjoin. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 to 14, # (2) Exhibit 15 to 32)(York, Steve)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 312 Filed: 11/19/2009, Entered: 11/23/2009 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Declaration of Jeff Parmet in further Support of [283] Motion for Limited Relief from Protective Order and in Opposition to Facebook [291] Motion to Enjoin. (York, Steve)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 311 Filed: 11/19/2009, Entered: 11/23/2009 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Declaration of Tyler Winklevoss in further Support of [283] Motion for Limited Relief from Protective Order and in Opposition to Facebook [291] Motion to Enjoin.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Audio/Video CD)(York, Steve)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 310 Filed: 11/19/2009, Entered: 11/23/2009 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Declaration of Cameron Winklevoss in further Support of [283] Motion for Limited Relief from Protective Order and in Opposition to Facebook [291] Motion to Enjoin. (York, Steve)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 309 Filed: 11/19/2009, Entered: 11/23/2009 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Response to Facebook's [291] Motion For Limited Relief From Stay and to Enjoin Individual Plaintiffs and Their Counsel. (York, Steve)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 308 Filed: 11/19/2009, Entered: 11/23/2009 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Facebook [295]Sealed Motion re [291] MOTION For Limited Relief From Stay and to Enjoin Individual Plaintiffs and Their Counsel. (York, Steve)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 305 Filed: 11/19/2009, Entered: 11/19/2009, Terminated: 11/20/2009 Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Motion for leave to file Reply by Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss, Divya Narendra. (Attachments: # (1) Reply)(York, Steve)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 304 Filed: 11/19/2009, Entered: 11/19/2009 Notice of Manual Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING by Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss, Divya Narendra Motion for Leave to File the Within Reply (Guray, Arthur)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 303 Filed: 11/17/2009, Entered: 11/17/2009 Notice of Manual Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING by Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss, Divya Narendra (Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 302 Filed: 11/16/2009, Entered: 11/16/2009 Errata
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Errata by Facebook, Inc. to [291] MOTION For Limited Relief From Stay and to Enjoin Individual Plaintiffs and Their Counsel. (Cooper, Monte)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Order on Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Electronic ORDER entered granting [300] Motion to Seal; granting [301] Motion to Seal. (Lovett, Jarrett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 301 Filed: 11/13/2009, Entered: 11/13/2009, Terminated: 11/16/2009 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Assented to MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' and Counsel's (Finnegan's) Response to Facebook's Motion for Limited Relief from Stay and to Enjoin Individual Plaintiffs and Their Counsel by Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss, Divya Narendra. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 300 Filed: 11/13/2009, Entered: 11/13/2009, Terminated: 11/16/2009 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Assented to MOTION to Seal Opposition to Motion to Enjoin and Motion for Leave to File Within Reply by Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss, Divya Narendra.(Mendillo, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 299 Filed: 11/13/2009, Entered: 11/13/2009 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter/request (non-motion) from Robert M. Mendillo updating the Court on the status of the pending arbitration. (Mendillo, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 298 Filed: 11/9/2009, Entered: 11/9/2009 Errata
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Errata by Facebook, Inc. to [291] MOTION For Limited Relief From Stay and to Enjoin Individual Plaintiffs and Their Counsel. (Cooper, Monte)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 297 Filed: 11/5/2009, Entered: 11/5/2009 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Exhibit 8, 9, 10, 12, 13, 21 re [292] DECLARATION re [291] MOTION For Limited Relief From Stay and to Enjoin Individual Plaintiffs and Their Counsel. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 9, # (2) Exhibit 10, # (3) Exhibit 12, # (4) Exhibit 13, # (5) Exhibit 21)(York, Steve)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 296 Filed: 11/5/2009, Entered: 11/5/2009 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Memorandum re [295] SEALED MOTION re [291] MOTION For Limited Relief From Stay and to Enjoin Individual Plaintiffs and Their Counsel. (York, Steve)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 295 Filed: 11/5/2009, Entered: 11/5/2009, Terminated: 7/22/2011 Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED MOTION re [291] MOTION For Limited Relief From Stay and to Enjoin Individual Plaintiffs and Their Counsel by Facebook, Inc..(York, Steve)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Order on Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Electronic ORDER entered granting [286] MOTION to Seal Document(s) by Facebook, Inc. (Lovett, Jarrett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 11/4/2009, Entered: 11/4/2009 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Facebook's Sealed Opposition to [283] Sealed Motion for Limited Relief From Stay. (Attachments: # (1) Sealed Exhibit A, # (2) Sealed Exhibit G)(York, Steve)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 293 Filed: 11/3/2009, Entered: 11/3/2009 Certificate of Service pursuant to LR 5.2
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc. re [291] MOTION For Limited Relief From Stay and to Enjoin Individual Plaintiffs and Their Counsel, [292] Declaration,,. (Cooper, Monte)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 292 Filed: 11/3/2009, Entered: 11/3/2009 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION re [291] MOTION For Limited Relief From Stay and to Enjoin Individual Plaintiffs and Their Counsel by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8 - Notice of Manual Filing, # (9) Exhibit 9 - Notice of Manual Filing, # (10) Exhibit 10 - Notice of Manual Filing, # (11) Exhibit 11, # (12) Exhibit 12 - Notice of Manual Filing, # (13) Exhibit 13 - Notice of Manual Filing, # (14) Exhibit 14, # (15) Exhibit 15, # (16) Exhibit 16, # (17) Exhibit 17, # (18) Exhibit 18, # (19) Exhibit 19, # (20) Exhibit 20, # (21) Exhibit 21 - Notice of Manual Filing)(Cooper, Monte)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 291 Filed: 11/3/2009, Entered: 11/3/2009, Terminated: 7/22/2011 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION For Limited Relief From Stay and to Enjoin Individual Plaintiffs and Their Counsel by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Notice of Manual Filing, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Monte)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 290 Filed: 11/3/2009, Entered: 11/3/2009 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Margaret A. Esquenet (Esquenet, Margaret)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 289 Filed: 11/3/2009, Entered: 11/3/2009 Certificate of Service pursuant to LR 5.2
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc. re [287] Opposition to Motion, [288] Declaration,. (Sutton, Theresa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 288 Filed: 11/3/2009, Entered: 11/3/2009 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION re [287] Opposition to Motion by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Notice of Manual Filing, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G - Notice of Manual Filing)(Sutton, Theresa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 287 Filed: 11/3/2009, Entered: 11/3/2009 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Filing an Opposition re [283] Counter Defendant Sealed Motion filed by Facebook, Inc.. with the clerks office. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Sutton, Theresa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 286 Filed: 11/3/2009, Entered: 11/3/2009, Terminated: 11/5/2009 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Seal Facebook's Motion to Enjoin Iand Exhibits 8, 9, 10, 12, 13 and 21 to Cooper Declaration, MOTION to Seal Document ( Responses due by 11/17/2009) by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Sutton, Theresa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 285 Filed: 11/3/2009, Entered: 11/3/2009, Terminated: 11/3/2009 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Seal Un-Redacted Opposition to Motion for Limited Relief from Stay and Exhibits A and G to Declaration in Support Thereof by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Sutton, Theresa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Order on Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Electronic ORDER entered granting [285] Assented to MOTION to Seal Un-Redacted Opposition to Motion for Limited Relief from Stay and Exhibits A and G to Declaration in Support Thereof by Facebook, Inc. (Lovett, Jarrett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 10/22/2009, Entered: 10/22/2009, Terminated: 7/22/2011 Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Counter Defendant Sealed Motion by Divya Narendra. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(York, Steve)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 282 Filed: 10/22/2009, Entered: 10/22/2009 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Affidavit of Sean F. O'Shea Volumes I & II by Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss, Divya Narendra. (York, Steve)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 281 Filed: 10/21/2009, Entered: 10/21/2009 Certificate of Service pursuant to LR 5.2
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss, Divya Narendra (Amended). (Mendillo, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Electronic ORDER entered granting [279] Motion for impoundment (Woodlock, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 280 Filed: 10/19/2009, Entered: 10/19/2009 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter/request (non-motion) from Robert M. Mendillo Re Assented-to Motion for Impoundment. (Mendillo, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 279 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: 10/8/2009, Terminated: 10/20/2009 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Assented to MOTION for Impoundment by Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss, Divya Narendra.(Mendillo, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 278 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: 10/8/2009 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M. Mendillo on behalf of Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss, Divya Narendra (Mendillo, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 277 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: 10/8/2009 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Peter E. Ball on behalf of Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss, Divya Narendra (Ball, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 276 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: 10/8/2009 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur J. Guray on behalf of Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss, Divya Narendra (Guray, Arthur)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 275 Filed: 9/30/2009, Entered: 9/30/2009 Case StayedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER entered. Case stayed and all outstanding motions terminated without prejudice in accordance with this Court's Memorandum and Order issued on 9/30/09.Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-10593-DPW, 1:04-cv-11923-DPW(Lovett, Jarrett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 274 Filed: 9/30/2009, Entered: 9/30/2009 Order on Motion to Disqualify CounselCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered directing the Clerk to stay this case and terminate all outstanding motions without prejudice to the motion of any party to reassert them no later than 30 days after the issuance of any mandate of the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit concerning the judgment entered by the United States District Court for the Northern District of California in Civil Action No. 07-01389-JW. Counsel in these cases are ORDERED to notify this Court with a status report within 10 days of any material developments concerning the continued vitality of the Northern District of California judgment; accordingly terminating [262] Motion to Disqualify Counsel.; terminating [212] Motion for Sanctions; terminating [227] Motion to Stay; terminating [232] Motion to Dismiss; terminating [233] Motion to Dismiss (Woodlock, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 273 Filed: 9/3/2009, Entered: 9/3/2009 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg OF ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL (Sutton, Theresa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 272 Filed: 8/11/2009, Entered: 8/11/2009 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Connectu, Inc., Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg re [263] Memorandum in Support of Motion, [262] MOTION to Disqualify Counsel Notice of Entry of Order Remanding ConnectU, Inc.'s Motion to Disqualify Counsel to the District Court, Order Requiring Further Briefing and Setting Hearing on ConnectU's Motion to Disqualify, and the Parties' Responses Thereto (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit, # (4) Exhibit)(Sutton, Theresa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 271 Filed: 7/28/2009, Entered: 7/28/2009 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, a copy of which is attached to this entry.. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 270 Filed: 7/28/2009, Entered: 7/28/2009 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EXCERPT Transcript of Motion Hearing held on June 2, 2008, before Judge Woodlock. Court Reporter: Diane M. Molas at 267/977-2909. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Redaction Request due 8/17/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/25/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/23/2009. (Scalfani, Deborah) Modified on 7/28/2009 (Scalfani, Deborah).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  E-Mail Notice Returned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        E-Mail Notice re Entry #271 originally issued on 7/28/09 returned as undeliverable. Name of Addressee: Daniel Kaufman. The ECF help desk has contacted the law firm on record, who advised that the attorney is no longer employed by that firm. The attorney's email address has been removed from the database to prevent the return of additional undelivered email notices. (Jones, Sherry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 269 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: 2/27/2009 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Daniel K. Hampton (Hampton, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 268 Filed: 2/26/2009, Entered: 2/26/2009 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to [262] MOTION to Disqualify Counsel (Leave to File Granted on February 23, 2009) filed by Connectu, Inc.. (Durney, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Electronic ORDER entered granting [267] Assented to MOTION for Leave to File A Brief in Reply to ConnectU Founders' Memorandum in Opposition to ConnectU, Inc.'s Motion to Disqualify Counsel by Connectu, Inc.; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Lovett, Jarrett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 267 Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: 2/20/2009, Terminated: 2/23/2009 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Assented to MOTION for Leave to File A Brief in Reply to ConnectU Founders' Memorandum in Opposition to ConnectU, Inc.'s Motion to Disqualify Counsel by Connectu, Inc..(Durney, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 266 Filed: 2/19/2009, Entered: 2/19/2009 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [262] MOTION to Disqualify Counsel filed by Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss, Divya Narendra. (Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Electronic ORDER entered granting [265] Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time until 2/19/09 to File Response to [262] MOTION to Disqualify Counsel. (Lovett, Jarrett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 265 Filed: 1/27/2009, Entered: 1/27/2009, Terminated: 1/28/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to 02/19/2009 to oppose ConnectU Inc.'s Motion to Disqualify Counsel by Connectu, Inc., Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss, Divya Narendra. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Hornick, John) Modified to remove duplicate text on 1/28/2009 (Seelye, Terri).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 264 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: 1/23/2009 Certificate of Service pursuant to LR 5.2
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Connectu, Inc. re [263] Memorandum in Support of Motion, Amended Certificate of Service to Declaration of James E. Towery. (Durney, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 263 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: 1/22/2009 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re [262] MOTION to Disqualify Counsel filed by Connectu, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of James E. Towery, Esq, # (2) Exhibits to Declaration)(Durney, Peter) Modified to remove duplicate text on 1/23/2009 (Seelye, Terri).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 262 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: 1/22/2009, Terminated: 9/30/2009 Motion to Disqualify Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Disqualify Counsel by Connectu, Inc..(Durney, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 261 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: 1/22/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER entered granting substitution of attorney filed by Eduardo Saverin. re [260] (329 in 1:04-cv-11923-DPW)(Seelye, Terri)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Order on Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Electronic ORDER entered granting [248] MOTION to Seal Exhibits 1, 2, and 3 to Opposition to Motion to Stay by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Lovett, Jarrett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 260 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: 1/16/2009, Terminated: 1/21/2009 Motion to Substitute Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Consent order granting substitution of Attorney by Eduardo Saverin.(Hampton, Daniel) Modified text & termed motion on 1/21/2009 (Seelye, Terri).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Electronic ORDER entered granting [240] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Added Evan A. Parke for Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss and Divya Narendra. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Forms and then scroll down to CM/ECF Forms. (Seelye, Terri)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 259 Filed: 1/9/2009, Entered: 1/9/2009 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Meredith H. Schoenfeld (Schoenfeld, Meredith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  E-Mail Notice Returned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        E-Mail Notice re 258 originally issued on 1/7/09 returned as undeliverable. Name of Addressee: Bhanu Sadasivan. The ECF help desk has contacted the law firm on record, who advised that the firm in no longer in business. The attorney's email address has been removed from the database to prevent the return of additional undelivered email notices. Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-11923-DPW, 1:07-cv-10593-DPW(Jones, Sherry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Electronic ORDER entered granting [258] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Added Alison P. Buchanan and James E. Towery for Connectu, Inc.. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Forms and then scroll down to CM/ECF Forms. (Seelye, Terri)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 258 Filed: 1/7/2009, Entered: 1/7/2009, Terminated: 1/8/2009 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of James E. Towery and Alison F. Buchanan Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 01010000000002249712. by Connectu, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Bailey, Gregg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 257 Filed: 12/31/2008, Entered: 12/31/2008 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Connectu, Inc. re [224] Response to Motion, Notice of Withdrawal from Motion for Sanction of Non-Dismissal and Joinder to Defendants Opposition to the ConnectU Founders Motion for Sanction of Non-Dismissal (Bailey, Gregg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 256 Filed: 12/30/2008, Entered: 12/30/2008 Certificate of Service pursuant to LR 5.2
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg re [248] MOTION to Seal Exhibits 1, 2, and 3 to Opposition to Motion to Stay, [252] Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, [251] Opposition to Motion, [254] Sealed Document. (Sutton, Theresa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 255 Filed: 12/30/2008, Entered: 12/30/2008 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Peter M. Durney on behalf of Connectu, Inc. (Durney, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 254 Filed: 12/29/2008, Entered: 12/30/2008 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Document: Exhibits 1-3 to the declaration of Theresa A. Sutton in support of Facebook defendants' opposition to plaintiffs' motion to stay. Related Documents [227], [251],[252]. (Seelye, Terri)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 253 Filed: 12/29/2008, Entered: 12/29/2008 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Connectu, Inc. re [251] Opposition to Motion, Joinder to Defendant Facebbook, Inc.'s Opposition to Founders' Sixth Motion to Stay (Bailey, Gregg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 252 Filed: 12/29/2008, Entered: 12/29/2008 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Theresa A. Sutton in Opposition re [227] MOTION to Stay -- Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay Any Dismissal of Claims -- [to Sixth Motion to Stay filed by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 4, # (2) Exhibit 5, # (3) Exhibit 6, # (4) Exhibit 7, # (5) Exhibit 8, # (6) Exhibit 9, # (7) Exhibit 10, # (8) Exhibit 11)(Sutton, Theresa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 251 Filed: 12/29/2008, Entered: 12/29/2008 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Opposition re [227] MOTION to Stay -- Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay Any Dismissal of Claims -- [to Sixth Motion to Stay] filed by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Sutton, Theresa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 250 Filed: 12/29/2008, Entered: 12/29/2008 Amended Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED DOCUMENT by Connectu, Inc.. Amended Corporate Disclosure. (Bailey, Gregg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 249 Filed: 12/29/2008, Entered: 12/29/2008 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Gregg P. Bailey on behalf of Connectu, Inc. (Bailey, Gregg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 248 Filed: 12/29/2008, Entered: 12/29/2008, Terminated: 1/20/2009 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Seal Exhibits 1, 2, and 3 to Opposition to Motion to Stay by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Sutton, Theresa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 247 Filed: 12/23/2008, Entered: 12/23/2008 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to [212] MOTION for Sanctions of non-dismissal or in the alternative to vacate final judgment pursuant to FRCP 60 -- Leave to File Reply Granted on December 23, 2008 filed by Connectu, Inc., Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss, Divya Narendra. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Margaret A. Esquenet, # (2) Exhibit A to Declaration, # (3) Exhibit B to Declaration, # (4) Exhibit C to Declaration)(Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 246 Filed: 12/23/2008, Entered: 12/23/2008 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Daniel P. Tighe (Tighe, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 245 Filed: 12/23/2008, Entered: 12/23/2008, Terminated: 12/23/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Reply to Facebook's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanction of Non-Dismissal, or in the Alternative to Vacate Final Judgment Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 60 by Connectu, Inc., Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss, Divya Narendra. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Proposed Reply to Defendants' Opposition, # (2) Exhibit Declaration of M. Esquenet, # (3) Exhibit A, # (4) Exhibit B, # (5) Exhibit C, # (6) Text of Proposed Order)(Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 244 Filed: 12/23/2008, Entered: 12/23/2008, Terminated: 12/24/2008 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Conditional Withdrawal of Representation of ConnectU, Inc. by Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss, Divya Narendra.(Hornick, John) Modified to term motion on 12/24/2008 (Seelye, Terri).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Electronic ORDER entered granting [245] Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Reply to Facebook's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanction of Non-Dismissal, or in the Alternative to Vacate Final Judgment Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 60 by Connectu, Inc., Cameron Winklevoss, Tyler Winklevoss, Divya Narendra; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Lovett, Jarrett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 243 Filed: 12/19/2008, Entered: 12/19/2008 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Motion re [232] MOTION to Dismiss filed by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Sutton, Theresa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 242 Filed: 12/18/2008, Entered: 12/18/2008 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to Motion re [240] MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Evan A. Parke filed by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Sutton, Theresa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Filing Fee/Payment Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filing fee/payment: $ 50., receipt number BST007844 for [240] MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Evan A. Parke (Gawlik, Cathy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 241 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: 12/17/2008 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION re [240] MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Evan A. Parke by Connectu, Inc.. (McConchie, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 240 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: 12/17/2008, Terminated: 1/13/2009 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Evan A. Parke by Connectu, Inc..(McConchie, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 239 Filed: 12/16/2008, Entered: 12/17/2008 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Document: Exhibit L to declaration of Evan Andrew Parke in support of motion. Related document [229]. (Seelye, Terri)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 238 Filed: 12/16/2008, Entered: 12/17/2008 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Document: Exhibit A to the declaration of Theresa A. Sutton in support of opposition. Related Document [223]. (Seelye, Terri)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 237 Filed: 12/16/2008, Entered: 12/16/2008 Certificate of Service pursuant to LR 5.2
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Connectu, Inc.. (Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 236 Filed: 12/16/2008, Entered: 12/16/2008 Notice of Manual Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING by Connectu, Inc. (Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 235 Filed: 12/16/2008, Entered: 12/16/2008 Certificate of Service pursuant to LR 5.2
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg re [224] Response to Motion, [225] Affidavit in Opposition (Oppo to Mtn for Sanctions). (Sutton, Theresa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 234 Filed: 12/16/2008, Entered: 12/16/2008 Certificate of Service pursuant to LR 5.2
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg re [226] Notice (Other) (Ntc of Ord re 4th Mtn to Stay). (Sutton, Theresa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 230 Filed: 12/16/2008, Entered: 12/16/2008, Terminated: 12/16/2008 Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Assented to MOTION to Seal Document by Connectu, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Order on Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Electronic ORDER entered granting [230] Assented to Motion to Seal Exhibit L to the December 15, 2008 Declaration of Evan AndrewParke re [229] Memorandum in Support of Motion. (Lovett, Jarrett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Order on Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Electronic ORDER entered granting [223] Assented to MOTION to Seal Exhibit A to Sutton Declaration in Support of Opposition to Motion for Sanctions. (Lovett, Jarrett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 233 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: 12/16/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss with prejudice by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg, Eduardo Saverin. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-11923-DPW, 1:07-cv-10593-DPW(Seelye, Terri)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 232 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: 12/16/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss with prejudice all claims against The Facebook, Inc. and Mark Zuckerberg by Connectu, Inc., ConnectU LLC, Divya Narendra, Tyler Winklevoss, Cameron Winklevoss.Associated Cases: 1:04-cv-11923-DPW, 1:07-cv-10593-DPW(Seelye, Terri)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 231 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: 12/16/2008 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by James P. Harrington on behalf of Special Master George C. Fisher to comply with order and judgment in action before the Honorable James Ware in US District Court for the Northern District of California ("California Action") involving claims in and parties to this action ("Massachusetts Action"). (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D)(Seelye, Terri)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 229 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: 12/15/2008 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re [227] MOTION to Stay -- Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay Any Dismissal of Claims -- -- Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay Consideration of the Motions to Dismiss Pending Appeal to the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit filed by Connectu, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Declaration of Evan Andrew Parke, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C, # (5) Exhibit D, # (6) Exhibit E, # (7) Exhibit F, # (8) Exhibit G, # (9) Exhibit H, # (10) Exhibit I, # (11) Exhibit J, # (12) Exhibit K)(Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 228 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: 12/15/2008 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Facebook, Inc. Of Order Dismissing the Northern District of California Action (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Chatterjee, I.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 227 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: 12/15/2008, Terminated: 9/30/2009 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Stay -- Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay Any Dismissal of Claims -- by Connectu, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 226 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: 12/12/2008 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg of Entry of Order Denying Motion for Stay of Execution (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Sutton, Theresa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 225 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: 12/12/2008 Affidavit in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re [224] Response to Motion,. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F)(Chatterjee, I.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 224 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: 12/12/2008 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion re [212] MOTION for Sanctions of non-dismissal or in the alternative to vacate final judgment pursuant to FRCP 60 filed by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Chatterjee, I.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 223 Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: 12/11/2008, Terminated: 12/16/2008 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Assented to MOTION to Seal Exhibit A to Sutton declaration in support of opposition to motion for sanctions by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Sutton, Theresa) Modified text on 12/12/2008 (Seelye, Terri).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Electronic ORDER entered APPROVING [221] Stipulation regarding enlargement of time to respond; defendant's opposition to [212] Plaintiff's MOTION for Sanctions of Non-Dismissal or in the Alternative to Vacate Final Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 60 is due by 12/12/2008.(Lovett, Jarrett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 221 Filed: 11/25/2008, Entered: 11/25/2008 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND [PROP] ORDER ENLARGING TIME TO RESP TO PL'S MTN FOR SANCTIONS by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Sutton, Theresa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 220 Filed: 11/24/2008, Entered: 11/24/2008 Certificate of Service pursuant to LR 5.2
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg re [211] Notice (Other), Notice (Other), [216] Notice (Other). (Sutton, Theresa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 219 Filed: 11/24/2008, Entered: 11/24/2008 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Document: Memorandum in support of motion for sanction of non-dismissal, or in the alternative, to vacate final judgment. Related Document [212]. (Seelye, Terri)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 218 Filed: 11/24/2008, Entered: 11/24/2008 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Document: Exhibit A to declaration of Meredith H. Schoenfeld. Related Document [213]. (Seelye, Terri)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 217 Filed: 11/24/2008, Entered: 11/24/2008 Certificate of Service pursuant to LR 5.2
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Connectu, Inc. (Hornick, John) Related Documents [218, [219]. Modified text & created links on 11/24/2008 (Seelye, Terri).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 216 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: 11/21/2008 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg OF COURT RULINGS (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Sutton, Theresa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 215 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: 11/21/2008 Notice of Manual Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING by Connectu, Inc. re [212] MOTION for Sanctions of non-dismissal or in the alternative to vacate final judgment pursuant to FRCP 60(Hornick, John) Modified text on 11/24/2008 (Seelye, Terri).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 214 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: 11/21/2008 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of John F. Hornick re [212] MOTION for Sanctions of non-dismissal or in the alternative to vacate final judgment pursuant to FRCP 60 by Connectu, Inc.. (Hornick, John) Modified text on 11/24/2008 (Seelye, Terri).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 213 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: 11/21/2008 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Meredith H. Schoenfeld re [212] MOTION for Sanctions of non-dismissal or in the alternative to vacate final judgment pursuant to FRCP 60 by Connectu, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit J, # (11) Exhibit K, # (12) Exhibit L)(Hornick, John) Modified text on 11/24/2008 (Seelye, Terri).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 212 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: 11/21/2008, Terminated: 9/30/2009 Motion for Sanctions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Sanctions of non-dismissal or in the alternative to vacate final judgment pursuant to FRCP 60 by Connectu, Inc..(Hornick, John) Modified text on 11/24/2008 (Seelye, Terri).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 211 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: 11/21/2008 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg OF COURT RULINGS (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E)(Sutton, Theresa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Order on Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Electronic ORDER entered granting [210] Assented to MOTION to Seal Document by Connectu, Inc. (Lovett, Jarrett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 210 Filed: 11/20/2008, Entered: 11/20/2008, Terminated: 11/21/2008 Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Assented to MOTION to Seal Document by Connectu, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings. (Dolan, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 209 Filed: 7/9/2008, Entered: 7/9/2008 Certificate of Service pursuant to LR 5.2
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg re [208] Notice (Other). (Sutton, Theresa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 208 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: 7/8/2008 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg Notice of Entry of Judgment Enforcing Settlement Agreement (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Judgment Enforcing Settlement Agreement)(Sutton, Theresa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 207 Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: 6/26/2008 Certificate of Service pursuant to LR 5.2
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg re [206] Notice (Other), Notice (Other). (Sutton, Theresa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 206 Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: 6/26/2008 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg re [191] Sealed Document Notice of Order Granting Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Sutton, Theresa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Mailed Memorandum and Opinion and transcripts to the Honorable James Ware, San Jose California. Related Document [204] (Seelye, Terri)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 204 Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: 6/4/2008 Memorandum & ORDERCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered directing that this Memorandum and any transcript that is prepared of the hearing before me be transmitted by the Clerk to Judge Ware, with any transcript of the in-camera portion of the hearing noted as being under seal in this Court in accordance with this Court's September 13, 2007 Order for Discovery of Computer Memory Devices.(Woodlock, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 205 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/5/2008 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EXHIBITS numbered 1 through 15 submitted by Jeffrey Parmet. (Seelye, Terri)FILED UNDER SEAL.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 203 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of D. Michael Underhill re [202] Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Michael D. Underhill by Connectu, Inc.. (McConchie, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 202 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008, Terminated: 6/2/2008 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Michael D. Underhill by Connectu, Inc..(McConchie, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Status Conference held on 6/2/2008: Parties address the issue of a discovery dispute regarding documents in connection with purported settlement and subject to a violation of a Court Order issued on 9/13/07 in open court; Court denies deft's request to dismiss this matter; En Camera hearing held with counsel for the deft's and for Jeff Parmet; Jeff Parmet is sworn and testifies; witness is found not in contempt; further hearing held in open court will all parties; Court informs all parties of said ruling; documents received by the Court; without objection, said documents will be maintained under seal, Court will not review the documents. An Order shall issue. (Court Reporter: Diane Molas)(Attorneys present: Hornick, Schoenfeld, Tighe, Underhill, Sutton, Oczek, Mosko, Jenkins, Hawk, Hampton, Chatterjee, Bauer, Gesmer, Sheehan) (Lovett, Jarrett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Electronic ORDER entered granting [202] Assented Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Added D. Michael Underhill for Connectu, Inc. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Forms and then scroll down to CM/ECF Forms. (Lovett, Jarrett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Filing Fee/Payment Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filing fee/payment: $ 50.00, receipt number BST003888 for [202] Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Michael D. Underhill (Russo, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 199 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008 Certificate of Service pursuant to LR 5.2
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg re [197] Notice (Other), [198] Notice (Other) OF CONFIDENTIAL UNDER SEAL DOCUMENTS. (Sutton, Theresa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 201 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008 Motion for Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to conduct Hearing re [195], [200] by Facebook, Inc. defendants.(Seelye, Terri)COMPLETE DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL IN CLERK'S OFFICE.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 200 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Opposition re [195] to Connectu, Inc.'s SEALED EMERGENCY MOTION for expedited hearing and in camera examination of documents and of the expert Parmet, in regard to 9/13/07 order filed by Facebook, Inc. (Seelye, Terri) COMPLETE DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL IN CLERK'S OFFICE.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 198 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: 5/29/2008 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING WITH CLERKS OFFICE (Oczek, Jeremy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 197 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: 5/29/2008 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg Notice of Filing with The Clerk's Office (Sutton, Theresa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 196 Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: 5/28/2008, Terminated: 5/28/2008 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Assented to MOTION to Seal by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Sutton, Theresa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order on Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Electronic ORDER entered granting [196] Assented to MOTION to Seal by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Lovett, Jarrett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Electronic ORDER entered. Responses to [195] SEALED EMERGENCY MOTION for expedited hearing and in camera examination of documents and of the expert Parmet, in regard to 9/13/07 order filed by Connectu, Inc. are hereby due no later than 12:00 PM on 5/29/2008. A hearing as to this Motion is set for 6/2/2008 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. Jeff Parmet and his attorney are hereby Order to attend said hearing.(Lovett, Jarrett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 195 Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: 5/21/2008 Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED EMERGENCY MOTION for expedited hearing and in camera examination of documents and of the expert Parmet, in regard to 9/13/07 order filed by Connectu, Inc.(Attachments: # (1) Declaration of John F. Hornick, # (2) Declaration of Meredith H. Schoenfeld)(Seelye, Terri)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 194 Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: 5/20/2008 Certificate of Service pursuant to LR 5.2
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Connectu, Inc.. (Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 193 Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: 5/20/2008 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Connectu, Inc. of manual filing of documents with Clerk's office. (Hornick, John) Modified text on 5/22/2008 (Seelye, Terri).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 192 Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: 5/20/2008, Terminated: 5/20/2008 Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Assented to MOTION to Seal Document by Connectu, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order on Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Electronic ORDER entered granting [192] Assented to MOTION to Seal Document by Connectu, Inc. (Lovett, Jarrett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: 4/29/2008 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of filing of motion. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A: Confidential Motion)Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-10593-DPW, 1:04-cv-11923-DPW.(Seelye, Terri) FILED UNDER SEAL.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 190 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: 4/28/2008 Order on Motion to Seal DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER entered granting [188] Motion to Seal Document. (Seelye, Terri)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 189 Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: 4/24/2008 Certificate of Service pursuant to LR 5.2
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg re Confidential Notice of Filing of Motion (Under Seal). (Sutton, Theresa) Related document [188]. Modified to create link on 4/28/2008 (Seelye, Terri).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 188 Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: 4/24/2008, Terminated: 4/25/2008 Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Seal Document by Dustin Moskovitz, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg, Eduardo Saverin. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Sutton, Theresa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 187 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: 4/23/2008 Certificate of Service pursuant to LR 5.2
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Connectu, Inc. re [186] Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance. (Wolfson, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 186 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: 4/23/2008 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Adam Wolfson and Quinn Emanuel Urquhart Oliver & Hedges, LLP (Wolfson, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 185 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: 4/23/2008 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Connectu, Inc. of Attorneys' Lien (Wolfson, Adam) Modified text on 4/24/2008 (Seelye, Terri).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 184 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: 4/7/2008 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of documents to be filed under seal by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Thefacebook LLC, Connectu, Inc., Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Sutton, Theresa) Modified text on 4/8/2008 (Seelye, Terri).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 183 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: 4/1/2008 Notice (Other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL:Electronic NOTICE re: sealed documents: pursuant to Magistrate Judge Collings' Order of 3/27/08 granting Motions 66, 69, 73, 80, 81 and 82 in the above-captioned matter, counsel shall designate the specific documents to be sealed by DOCKET NUMBER AND/OR EXHIBIT NUMBER on or before 4/7/08. (Dolan, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Electronic ORDER entered terminating [30] Motion to Dismiss; terminating [83] Motion to Dismiss; terminating [84] Motion to Strike ; terminating [85] Motion for Summary Judgment; terminating [87] Motion to Dismiss; terminating [89] Motion to Dismiss; terminating [91] Motion to Dismiss; terminating [16] Motion to Dismiss; terminating [17] Motion to Dismiss; terminating [176] Motion for Summary Judgment; terminating [181] Sealed Motion; terminating [182] Motion for Extension of Time (Lovett, Jarrett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Order on Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings: Electronic ORDER entered granting Motions to seal [66],[69],[73],[80],[81],[82]. Modified text on 3/28/2008 (Seelye, Terri).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Order on Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings: Electronic ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part [132] Motion to Compel. In the exercise of the Court's discretion, it is ORDERED that plaintiff's expert, at the Facebook Defendants' expense, image and search for computer program source code files and database definitions on the ten computer storage devices listed in Attorney Wolfson's letter on November 30, 2007 [165]. More specifically, the motion to compel Request #117 is ALLOWED except that the motion is DENIED as to that part of Request #117 which reads: "...or any software reflecting the creation, development and operation of the ConnectU website, the Social Butterfly Program, or the Facebook Importer program." Counsel shall submit to the Court, on or before the close of business on March 4, 2008, a form of Order to be entered by the Court which is agreeable to all parties and which shall set forth the protocols to be used in the imaging and searching. The Order shall set a date by which plaintiff's must supplement their response to Request 1 and produce any material not previously produced which is discovered as a result of the imaging and searching. The motion to compel as to Requests #2 and ##67-68 is DENIED. See Rule 26(b(2)(C), Fed. R. Civ. P.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 182 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: 2/15/2008, Terminated: 3/31/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to March 10, 2008 to To File Oppositions to the Parties' Pending Motion for Summary Judgment by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Monte)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 181 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: 2/13/2008, Terminated: 3/31/2008 Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED MOTION (Notice of) and memorandum of law to file supplemental authority in opposition to defendants' motion for summary judgment and renewed Rule 56(F) motion by Connectu, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Exhibits A thru F)(Seelye, Terri)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 180 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: 2/13/2008 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Connectu, Inc. of Filing With Clerk's Office (Tighe, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order on Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Electronic ORDER entered granting [175] Motion for leave to File Under Seal (Lovett, Jarrett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 179 Filed: 2/12/2008, Entered: 2/12/2008 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re [176] MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Claim of Copyright Infringement filed by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Chatterjee, I.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 178 Filed: 2/12/2008, Entered: 2/12/2008 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION re [177] Memorandum in Support of [176] MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Claim of Copyright Infringement by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit 10, # (11) Exhibit 11, # (12) Exhibit 12, # (13) Exhibit 13)(Chatterjee, I.) Modified text on 2/13/2008 (Seelye, Terri).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 177 Filed: 2/12/2008, Entered: 2/12/2008 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re [176] MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Claim of Copyright Infringement filed by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Chatterjee, I.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 176 Filed: 2/12/2008, Entered: 2/12/2008, Terminated: 3/31/2008 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Claim of Copyright Infringement by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Chatterjee, I.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 175 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: 2/8/2008, Terminated: 2/13/2008 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Seal or file under Seal: (I) Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Memorandum of Law to File Supplemental Authority in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; and (II) Renewed Rule 56(F) Motion by Connectu, Inc..(Tighe, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Electronic ORDER entered granting [173], [174] Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Added David E. Azar for plaintiff Connectu, Inc. and Sean A. Lincoln for defendants Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc. and Mark Zuckerberg. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Forms and then scroll down to CM/ECF Forms. (Seelye, Terri)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 174 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: 1/29/2008, Terminated: 2/4/2008 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of David E. Azar Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 01010000000001829904. by Connectu, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Declaration of David Azar )(Wolfson, Adam) Modified text on 2/4/2008 (Seelye, Terri).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 173 Filed: 1/28/2008, Entered: 1/28/2008, Terminated: 2/4/2008 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Sean A. Lincoln Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 01010000000001827994. by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Sean A. Lincoln)(Oczek, Jeremy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: 1/7/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on November 19, 2007 before Judge Collings. Digital Recording: Transcribed by Maryann Young. The original transcripts are maintained by the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting Maryann Young at 508/384-2003 or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 171 Filed: 12/7/2007, Entered: 12/7/2007 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Response by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg to [167] Response to Motion to Unseal. (Chatterjee, I.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 170 Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: 12/4/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION OF LUKE O'BRIEN by 02138. (Ritvo, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 169 Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: 12/4/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION OF BOM KIM by 02138. (Ritvo, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: 12/4/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on November 30, 2007 before Judge Woodlock. Court Reporter: Brenda K. Hancock. The original transcripts are maintained by the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter at 617/439-3214 or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 166 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 11/30/2007 Certificate of Service pursuant to LR 5.2
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Connectu, Inc. re [165] Notice (Other). (Wolfson, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 165 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 11/30/2007 Notice (Other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Facebook, Inc. re [137] Opposition to Motion Letter from Adam Wolfson to Judge Collings (Wolfson, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 11/30/2007, Terminated: 11/30/2007 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Laurence F. Pulgram Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 1761710. by Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Declaration of Laurence F. Pulgram)(Oczek, Jeremy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Order on Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Motion Hearing held on 11/30/2007 re (305) SEALED Motion for Temporary Restraining Order in case # 1:04-cv-11923-DPW, and (162) SEALED Motion for Temporary Restraining Order in case # 1:07-cv-10593-DPW: Parties inform the Court of discovery leading up to todays hearing; Court will allow a proposed plan for discovery; O'Brien and representative of magazine are to file declarations by 12/4/07; parties inform the Court of preliminary plans for discovery; Court recesses to allow the parties to consult with their clients; Court resumes; atty Balin reports that some of the documents at issue were received from the Clerks Office of the Court of Appeals; 02138 states that redactions as to the deposition transcript will be made; the cash flow document does not disclose much; 02138 has additional documents in it's possession; after oral arguments of the parties; the Court DENIES (162) Motion for TRO in case 1:07-cv-10593-DPW; and DENIES (305) Motion for TRO in case 1:04-cv-11923-DPW treated as a preliminary injunction as stated and recorded in the stenogropher's notes. Facebook is to file a response as to 02138's request to unseal submissions by 12/7/07; the parties proposals as to discovery are due by 12/7/07 if necessary. (Court Reporter: Brenda Hancock)(Attorneys present: Tighe, Hornick, Schoenfeld, Calamari, Wolfson, Esquenet, Hart, Bea, Chatterjee, Bauer, Batten, Hampton, Hawk, Shafroth, Pulgram, Ritvo, Balin, Handman, Husbanda) Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-10593-DPW, 1:04-cv-11923-DPW(Lovett, Jarrett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic ORDER entered granting [164] Assented Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Added Laurence F. Pulgram for Mark Zuckerberg: Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Forms and then scroll down to CM/ECF Forms. (Lovett, Jarrett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: 12/3/2007 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Motion re [162] SEALED MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed UNDER SEAL by 02138. (Hurley, Virginia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 163 Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: 11/29/2007 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT on Discovery by Eduardo Saverin. (Hampton, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 162 Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: 11/29/2007, Terminated: 11/30/2007 Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg, Eduardo Saverin. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration# (2) Exhibit # (3) Exhibit # (4) Text of Proposed Order)(Nici, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 161 Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: 11/29/2007, Terminated: 11/29/2007 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Assented to MOTION to Seal Documents by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg.(Bauer, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing on Motion [162] SEALED MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order : Motion Hearing set for 11/30/2007 12:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Lovett, Jarrett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order on Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic ORDER entered granting [161] Assented to MOTION to Seal Documents (Lovett, Jarrett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 160 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re [148] filed by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Cooper, Monte) Modified on 11/21/2007 (Nici, Richard).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 159 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re [132] MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Image and Search Their Memory Devices For Source Code, And To Comply with Requests for Production Nos. 102, 67-68 and 117 filed by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Sutton, Theresa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff: 11/19/07 Motion Hearing clerknote edited to change typo re deadline for Plaintiff to file statement - statement due 11/30/07. (Russo, Noreen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Robert B. Collings: Motion Hearing held on 11/19/2007 re: [132] MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Image and Search Their Memory Devices For Source Code, And To Comply with Requests for Production Nos. 102, 67-68 and 117 filed by Mark Zuckerberg, Andrew McCollum, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Dustin Moskovitz, and [146] MOTION to Compel Response to Interrogatory No. 1 filed by Mark Zuckerberg, Andrew McCollum, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Christopher Hughes, Dustin Moskovitz. Court takes [132] under advisement; plaintiffs to file a statement on or before cob 11/30/2007 as to how many memory devices would have to be imaged if the motion were allowed. Court rules on [146].(Digital Recording) Modified on 11/19/2007 (Russo, Noreen).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Order on Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Robert B. Collings: Electronic ORDER entered granting [134] Motion to Seal; granting [156] Motion for Leave to File (Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document); granting [146]The Facebook Defendants' Motion to Compel Response to Interrogatory No. 1. The plaintiffs are ORDERED to serve a full and complete answer to Interrogatory #1 from all sources of information within their possession, custody and/or control on or before the close of business on Tuesday, January 15, 2008.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: 11/16/2007 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Supplemental Response by Facebook, Inc. to [102] Order re Location of Relevant Code. (Sutton, Theresa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: 11/16/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION re [156] Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Facebook Defendants' Motion to Compel Response to Interrogatory No. 1 by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 18# (2) Exhibit 19# (3) Exhibit 20# (4) Exhibit 21# (5) Exhibit 22# (6) Exhibit 23# (7) Exhibit 24# (8) Exhibit 25)(Cooper, Monte)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: 11/16/2007, Terminated: 11/19/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Facebook Defendants' Motion to Compel Response to Interrogatory No. 1 by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A: Reply# (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Monte)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: 11/16/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION re [150] Declaration,,, re De-Designation of Exhibit 34 by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) # (2))(Sutton, Theresa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: 11/16/2007 Certificate of Service pursuant to LR 5.2
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Connectu, Inc. re [152] Declaration, [151] Response to Motion, [153] Response to Motion,. (Wolfson, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: 11/16/2007 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Motion re [146] MOTION to Compel Response to Interrogatory No. 1 Corrected Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to the Facebook Defendants' Motion to Compel Response to Interrogatory No. 1 filed by Connectu, Inc.. (Wolfson, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing on Motion [146] MOTION to Compel Response to Interrogatory No. 1 : Motion Hearing set for 11/19/2007 @ 11:00 AM in Courtroom 23 before Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings. (Russo, Noreen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 11/15/2007, Entered: 11/15/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION re [151] Response to Motion Declaration of Adam Wolfson in Support of Plaintiffs' Memo in Opposition to the Defendants' Motion to Compel Response to Interrogatory No. 1 by Connectu, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Wolfson, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 11/15/2007, Entered: 11/15/2007 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion re [146] MOTION to Compel Response to Interrogatory No. 1 filed by Connectu, Inc.. (Wolfson, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Order on Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Judge Robert B. Collings : Electronic ORDER entered granting [144] Motion to Seal; and granting [149] Motion for Leave to File; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Dolan, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 150 Filed: 11/14/2007, Entered: 11/14/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION re [149] Assented to MOTION for Leave to File The Facebook Defendants' Memorandum In Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition [Dkt 137] to Defendants' Motion to Compel Plaintiffs to Image and Search Their Memory Devices for Source Code, and To Comply wiAssented to MOTION for Leave to File The Facebook Defendants' Memorandum In Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition [Dkt 137] to Defendants' Motion to Compel Plaintiffs to Image and Search Their Memory Devices for Source Code, and To Comply wi by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 26# (2) Exhibit 27# (3) Exhibit 28# (4) Exhibit 29# (5) Exhibit 30# (6) Exhibit 31# (7) Exhibit 32# (8) Exhibit 33# (9) Exhibit 34# (10) Exhibit 35# (11) Exhibit 36)(Sutton, Theresa) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/20/2007 (Nici, Richard).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 149 Filed: 11/14/2007, Entered: 11/14/2007, Terminated: 11/15/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Assented to MOTION for Leave to File The Facebook Defendants' Memorandum In Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition [Dkt 137] to Defendants' Motion to Compel Plaintiffs to Image and Search Their Memory Devices for Source Code, and To Comply with Requests for Production Nos. 1-2, 67-68, and 117 by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (Reply)# (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Sutton, Theresa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 148 Filed: 11/14/2007, Entered: 11/14/2007 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Monte M.F. Cooper in Support re [146] MOTION to Compel Response to Interrogatory No. 1 filed by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2# (3) Exhibit 3# (4) Exhibit 4# (5) Exhibit 5# (6) Exhibit 6# (7) Exhibit 7# (8) Exhibit 8# (9) Exhibit 9# (10) Exhibit 10# (11) Exhibit 11# (12) Exhibit 12# (13) Exhibit 13# (14) Exhibit 14# (15) Exhibit 15# (16) Exhibit 16# (17) Exhibit 17)(Cooper, Monte)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 147 Filed: 11/14/2007, Entered: 11/14/2007 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re [146] MOTION to Compel Response to Interrogatory No. 1 filed by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Cooper, Monte)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 146 Filed: 11/14/2007, Entered: 11/14/2007, Terminated: 11/19/2007 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Compel Response to Interrogatory No. 1 by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Monte)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 145 Filed: 11/14/2007, Entered: 11/14/2007 Certificate of Service pursuant to LR 5.2
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg re [144] Assented to MOTION to Seal Under Seal Exhibits 31 and 34 to The Declaration of Theresa Sutton. (Sutton, Theresa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 144 Filed: 11/14/2007, Entered: 11/14/2007, Terminated: 11/15/2007 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Assented to MOTION to Seal by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Sutton, Theresa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 11/8/2007, Entered: 11/8/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on October 17, 2007 before Judge Woodlock. Court Reporter: Marcia G. Patrisso. The original transcripts are maintained by the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter at 617/737-8728 or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing on Motion [132] MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Image and Search Their Memory Devices For Source Code, And To Comply with Requests for Production Nos. 102, 67-68 and 117 : Motion Hearing set for 11/19/2007 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 23 before Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings. (Dolan, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 142 Filed: 11/7/2007, Entered: 11/7/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Tyler Winklevoss by Connectu, Inc.. (Tighe, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 141 Filed: 11/7/2007, Entered: 11/7/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Howard Winklevoss by Connectu, Inc.. (Tighe, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 140 Filed: 11/7/2007, Entered: 11/7/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Cameron Winklevoss by Connectu, Inc.. (Tighe, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 139 Filed: 11/7/2007, Entered: 11/7/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Divya Narendra by Connectu, Inc.. (Tighe, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 138 Filed: 11/7/2007, Entered: 11/7/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Adam B. Wolfson by Connectu, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1))(Tighe, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 137 Filed: 11/7/2007, Entered: 11/7/2007 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Opposition re [132] MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Image and Search Their Memory Devices For Source Code, And To Comply with Requests for Production Nos. 102, 67-68 and 117 filed by Connectu, Inc.. (Tighe, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 136 Filed: 10/24/2007, Entered: 10/24/2007 Certificate of Service pursuant to LR 5.2
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg re [133] Memorandum in Support of Motion, and Under Seal Exhibits to the Declaration of Monte Cooper in Support Thereof. (Sutton, Theresa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 135 Filed: 10/24/2007, Entered: 10/24/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION re [132] MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Image and Search Their Memory Devices For Source Code, And To Comply with Requests for Production Nos. 102, 67-68 and 117 by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1A# (2) Exhibit 1B# (3) Exhibit 2# (4) Exhibit 3, 4, 20, 21, and 22 (UNDER SEAL)# (5) Exhibit 5# (6) Exhibit 6# (7) Exhibit 7# (8) Exhibit 8# (9) Exhibit 9# (10) Exhibit 10# (11) Exhibit 11# (12) Exhibit 12# (13) Exhibit 13# (14) Exhibit 14# (15) Exhibit 15# (16) Exhibit 16# (17) Exhibit 17# (18) Exhibit 18A# (19) Exhibit 18B# (20) Exhibit 18C# (21) Exhibit 19A# (22) Exhibit 19B# (23) Exhibit 23# (24) Exhibit 24# (25) Exhibit 25)(Sutton, Theresa) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/26/2007 (Nici, Richard).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 134 Filed: 10/24/2007, Entered: 10/24/2007, Terminated: 11/19/2007 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Assented to MOTION to Seal Memorandum In Support of Motion to Compel and Certain Exhibits to the Declaration of Monte Cooper by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Sutton, Theresa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 132 Filed: 10/24/2007, Entered: 10/24/2007, Terminated: 2/20/2008 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Image and Search Their Memory Devices For Source Code, And To Comply with Requests for Production Nos. 102, 67-68 and 117 by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Sutton, Theresa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Motions Taken Under Advisement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motions Taken Under Advisement: [16] MOTION to Dismiss, [87] MOTION to Dismiss, [91] MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(B)(6), [85] MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Claims for Breach of Contract, Breach of the Covenant of Good Faith and Fair Dealing, and Promissory Estoppel, [89] MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FED.R.CIV.P. 12(B)(6), [17] MOTION to Dismiss, [83] MOTION to Dismiss, [30] MOTION to Dismiss, [84] MOTION to Strike Demands in Prayer For Relief in First Amended Complaint (Lovett, Jarrett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Motion Hearing held on 10/17/2007 re [82] MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Defendants' Motion to Strike Demands filed by Mark Zuckerberg, Andrew McCollum, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Christopher Hughes, Dustin Moskovitz, [66] Assented to MOTION to Seal Document Assented-To Motion to Seal Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint and Exhibits to the Declaration of Meredith H. Schoenfeld filed by Connectu, Inc., [16] MOTION to Dismiss filed by Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., [91] MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(B)(6) filed by Andrew McCollum, Dustin Moskovitz, [69] Assented to MOTION to Seal Document --Exhibit to the Declaration of Meredith H. Schoenfeld filed by Connectu, Inc., [89] MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FED.R.CIV.P. 12(B)(6) filed by Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., [17] MOTION to Dismiss filed by Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Dustin Moskovitz, [83] MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mark Zuckerberg, [81] MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, and Exhibit 5 to the Declaration of Monte Cooper ISO Same filed by Mark Zuckerberg, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., [30] MOTION to Dismiss filed by Eduardo Saverin, [84] MOTION to Strike Demands in Prayer For Relief in First Amended Complaint filed by Mark Zuckerberg, Andrew McCollum, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Dustin Moskovitz, [87] MOTION to Dismiss filed by Eduardo Saverin, [85] MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Claims for Breach of Contract, Breach of the Covenant of Good Faith and Fair Dealing, and Promissory Estoppel filed by Mark Zuckerberg, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., [80] MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Mark Zuckerberg's Motion to Dismiss filed by Mark Zuckerberg, [73] Assented to MOTION to Seal --ASSENTED-TO MOTION TO SEAL PLAINTIFFS' EXHIBITS TO SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF MEREDITH H. SHOENFELD filed by Connectu, Inc.: Atty's Werder, Tighe and Wolfson for Connectu, Inc.; Atty's Chatterjee, Cooper, Bauer, Guy and Sutton for Facebook, Inc.; Atty Hampton for Eduardo Saverin; Saverin has not satisfied discovery obligations; Cour Orders Saverin to comply with discovery; Facebook near completion of document production; Court Orders document production as to Saverin to be completed within 2 weeks; pltff does not object to sealing of source code and financial materials; after oral arguments of both sides Court reserves ruling on motions to seal and takes dispositive motions under advisement. (Court Reporter Marcia Patrisso.) (Lovett, Jarrett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 131 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: 10/5/2007 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re [91] MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(B)(6) filed by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum. (Chatterjee, I.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 130 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: 10/5/2007 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re [89] MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FED.R.CIV.P. 12(B)(6) filed by Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc.. (Chatterjee, I.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 129 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: 10/5/2007 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re [84] MOTION to Strike Demands in Prayer For Relief in First Amended Complaint filed by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Chatterjee, I.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 128 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: 10/5/2007 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re [83] MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mark Zuckerberg. (Chatterjee, I.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 127 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: 10/5/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION re [126] Reply to Response to Motion, by Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 6)(Chatterjee, I.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 126 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: 10/5/2007 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re [85] MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Claims for Breach of Contract, Breach of the Covenant of Good Faith and Fair Dealing, and Promissory Estoppel filed by Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Chatterjee, I.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 125 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: 10/5/2007 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re [87] MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Eduardo Saverin. (Shafroth, Nathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 124 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: 10/5/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION re [111] Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1, Declaration of Anastasia Fernands in Support of Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by Connectu, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Declaration of A. Fernands Exhibit 1)(Fernands, Anastasia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic ORDER entered granting [105] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Renee Bea for Connectu, Inc., Peter E. Calamari for Connectu, Inc., Sarah Hartley for Connectu, Inc., Richard Werder for Connectu, Inc., Adam Wolfson for Connectu, Inc. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Forms and then scroll down to CM/ECF Forms. (Nici, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 123 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: 9/24/2007 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Facebook Defendants' Response to Court's September 13, 2007 Order Regarding Location of Relevant Code Response by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Chatterjee, I.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Filing Fee/Payment Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filing fee: $ 250.00, receipt number 82520 for [105] MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Renee Bea, Peter Calamari, Sarah Hartley, Rick Werder and Adam Wolfson (Diskes, Sheila) Modified on 9/25/2007 (Diskes, Sheila).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Notice requesting courtesy copy
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy of Exhibits Attached to Docket No. 117. Counsel who filed this document are requested to submit a courtesy copy of these attachments to the Clerk's Office as soon as possible. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy for Magistrate Judge Collings and reflect the document number (#117) assigned by CM/ECF. (Dolan, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 122 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/21/2007 Proposed Document(s) submitted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Document(s) submitted by Facebook, Inc.. Document received: Proposed Order Sealing Certain Portions of Connectu's First Amended Complaint, Certain Exhibits of the Declaration of Meredith Schoenfeld In Support Thereof, and Defendants' Motion to Strike Demands in Prayer for Relief. (Sutton, Theresa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 121 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/21/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Jennifer S. Muller by Facebook, Inc.. (Sutton, Theresa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 120 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/21/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION Of Owen Van Natta by Facebook, Inc.. (Sutton, Theresa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 119 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/21/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION re [117] Response to Order to Show Cause Declaration of Mark Zuckerberg by Facebook, Inc.. (Sutton, Theresa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 118 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/21/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION re [117] Response to Order to Show Cause Declaration of Michael Trinh by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) # (3) Exhibit 3)(Sutton, Theresa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 117 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/21/2007 Response to Order to Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, Part 1# (2) Exhibit A, Part 2# (3) Exhibit B# (4) Exhibit D# (5) Exhibit D)(Sutton, Theresa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 116 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/21/2007 Certificate of Service pursuant to LR 5.2
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Connectu, Inc. re [113] Declaration, [115] Declaration, [114] Declaration, [112] Response to Motion,,,. (Fernands, Anastasia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 115 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/21/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of CAMERON WINKLEVOSS[112] Response to Motion,,, by Connectu, Inc.. (Fernands, Anastasia) Modified on 10/5/2007 (Nici, Richard).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 114 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/21/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of DIVYA NARENDRA [112] Response to Motion,,, by Connectu, Inc.. (Fernands, Anastasia) Modified on 10/5/2007 (Nici, Richard).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 113 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/21/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION OF VICTOR GAO [112] Response to Motion,,, by Connectu, Inc.. (Fernands, Anastasia) Modified on 10/5/2007 (Nici, Richard).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 112 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/21/2007 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Motion re [82] MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Defendants' Motion to Strike Demands, [91] MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(B)(6), [89] MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FED.R.CIV.P. 12(B)(6), [83] MOTION to Dismiss, [81] MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, and Exhibit 5 to the Declaration of Monte Cooper ISO Same, [84] MOTION to Strike Demands in Prayer For Relief in First Amended Complaint, [85] MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Claims for Breach of Contract, Breach of the Covenant of Good Faith and Fair Dealing, and Promissory Estoppel, [80] MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Mark Zuckerberg's Motion to Dismiss filed by Connectu, Inc.. (Fernands, Anastasia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 111 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/21/2007 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re [81] MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, and Exhibit 5 to the Declaration of Monte Cooper ISO Same, [85] MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Claims for Breach of Contract, Breach of the Covenant of Good Faith and Fair Dealing, and Promissory Estoppel filed by Connectu, Inc.. (Fernands, Anastasia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 110 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/21/2007 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Opposition re [87] MOTION to Dismiss filed by Connectu, Inc.. (Fernands, Anastasia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 109 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/21/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION re [108] Response to Motion,,, by Connectu, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A)(Fernands, Anastasia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 108 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/21/2007 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion re [82] MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Defendants' Motion to Strike Demands, [66] Assented to MOTION to Seal Document Assented-To Motion to Seal Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint and Exhibits to the Declaration of Meredith H. Schoenfeld, [69] Assented to MOTION to Seal Document --Exhibit to the Declaration of Meredith H. Schoenfeld, [81] MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, and Exhibit 5 to the Declaration of Monte Cooper ISO Same, [80] MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Mark Zuckerberg's Motion to Dismiss, [73] Assented to MOTION to Seal --ASSENTED-TO MOTION TO SEAL PLAINTIFFS' EXHIBITS TO SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF MEREDITH H. SHOENFELD filed by Connectu, Inc.. (Fernands, Anastasia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/21/2007 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re [83] MOTION to Dismiss FILED UNDER SEAL filed by Mark Zuckerberg. (Chatterjee, I.) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/21/2007 (Nici, Richard).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/21/2007 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support re [85] MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Claims for Breach of Contract, Breach of the Covenant of Good Faith and Fair Dealing, and Promissory Estoppel filed by Mark Zuckerberg.FILED UNDER SEAL (Nici, Richard) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/21/2007 (Nici, Richard). Additional attachment(s) added on 9/21/2007 (Nici, Richard).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 105 Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: 9/19/2007, Terminated: 9/26/2007 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Renee Bea, Peter Calamari, Sarah Hartley, Rick Werder and Adam Wolfson by Connectu, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit)(McConchie, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 104 Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: 9/19/2007 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Anastasia M. Fernands on behalf of Connectu, Inc. (Fernands, Anastasia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 103 Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: 9/13/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings: ORDER entered. ORDER FOR DISCOVERY OF COMPUTER MEMORY DEVICES.(Russo, Noreen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 102 Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: 9/13/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Robert B. Collings : ORDER ON REMAINING DISPUTED DISCOVERY ITEMS OUTLINED IN THE CORRECTED AMENDED JOINT REPORT, ETC. (#94) entered. (Dolan, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Hearing (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Robert B. Collings: Hearing re: disputed issues delineated in [94] held on 9/13/2007. After hearing, taken under advisement. (Digital Recording: 11:38:33-12:02:15)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: 9/10/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on July 25, 2007 before Judge Woodlock. Court Reporter: Marie L. Cloonan. The original transcripts are maintained by the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter at 617/439-7086 or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 100 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: 9/5/2007 Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/HearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : ORDER entered re: Extension of Time as to [87] MOTION to Dismiss, [91] MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(B)(6), [84] MOTION to Strike Demands in Prayer For Relief in First Amended Complaint, [83] MOTION to Dismiss, [89] MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FED.R.CIV.P. 12(B)(6), [85] MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Claims for Breach of Contract, Breach of the Covenant of Good Faith and Fair Dealing, and Promissory Estoppel: This Court grants Plaintiffs an extension of time to September 21, 2007 to opposeDefendants motions to dismiss, motion to strike, and motion for summary judgment filed on August 29, 2007 (Dkt. 83, 84, 85, 87,89, 91). This Court further grants Defendants an extension of time to October 5, 2007 to reply to Plaintiffs oppositions.(Lovett, Jarrett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 133 Filed: 10/24/2007, Entered: 10/24/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support re 132 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs to Image and Search Their Memory Devices For Source Code, And To Comply with Requests for Production Nos. 102, 67-68 and 117 (CONFIDENTIAL FILED UNDER SEAL) filed by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Sutton, Theresa) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/26/2007 (Nici, Richard).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Terminate Motions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motions terminated: [18] MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mark Zuckerberg. (Nici, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing on Motion [17] MOTION to Dismiss, [18] MOTION to Dismiss, [81] MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, and Exhibit 5 to the Declaration of Monte Cooper ISO Same, [69] Assented to MOTION to Seal Document --Exhibit to the Declaration of Meredith H. Schoenfeld, [83] MOTION to Dismiss, [84] MOTION to Strike Demands in Prayer For Relief in First Amended Complaint, [87] MOTION to Dismiss, [85] MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Claims for Breach of Contract, Breach of the Covenant of Good Faith and Fair Dealing, and Promissory Estoppel, [89] MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FED.R.CIV.P. 12(B)(6), [80] MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Mark Zuckerberg's Motion to Dismiss, [16] MOTION to Dismiss, [82] MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Defendants' Motion to Strike Demands, [73] Assented to MOTION to Seal --ASSENTED-TO MOTION TO SEAL PLAINTIFFS' EXHIBITS TO SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF MEREDITH H. SHOENFELD, [66] Assented to MOTION to Seal Document Assented-To Motion to Seal Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint and Exhibits to the Declaration of Meredith H. Schoenfeld, [30] MOTION to Dismiss, [91] MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(B)(6) : Motion Hearing set for 10/17/2007 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Lovett, Jarrett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic ORDER entered as to [82] MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Defendants' Motion to Strike Demands, [73] Assented to MOTION to Seal --ASSENTED-TO MOTION TO SEAL PLAINTIFFS' EXHIBITS TO SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF MEREDITH H. SHOENFELD, [69] Assented to MOTION to Seal Document --Exhibit to the Declaration of Meredith H. Schoenfeld, [81] MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, and Exhibit 5 to the Declaration of Monte Cooper ISO Same, [66] Assented to MOTION to Seal Document Assented-To Motion to Seal Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint and Exhibits to the Declaration of Meredith H. Schoenfeld, [80] MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Mark Zuckerberg's Motion to Dismiss: The parties are to show cause on or before September 21, 2007, if any there be apart from the disposition of the parties to assent as being within the protective order, why the motions to seal ( Nos. 66, 69, 73, 80, 81, 82) should be allowed. Ant further responsive submissions may be filed on or before October 5, 2007. (Lovett, Jarrett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Notice of Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING: Hearing set for 9/13/2007 at 11:30 AM at Courtroom #23, John Joseph Moakley United States Courthouse, Boston, Massachusetts before Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings on all disputes set forth in the Corrected Amended Joint Report, Etc. (#94) filed August 29, 2007.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic ORDER entered granting [96] Motion for Extension of Time; denying [97] Motion for modification of briefing schedule regarding summary judgment motions, except that the summary judgment briefing schedule shall be extended in accordance with the briefing schedule for the motions to dismiss extended through the grant of [96], the question of summary judgment on contract-like claims being especially conducive to effective opposition, if well founded, by the opposing minds said to have met, who should be well positioned to identify - without further discovery - the existence of any genuine issues of material fact regarding such claims. (Woodlock, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 97 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: 8/30/2007, Terminated: 9/2/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Summary Judgment Scheduling Conference, or Alternatively, for a Scheduling Order by Connectu, Inc..(Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 96 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: 8/30/2007, Terminated: 9/2/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to September 21, 2007 to File Oppositions to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss and Motion to Strike -- and Joint Motion for Extension of Time to October 5, 2007 for Defendants to Reply to Plaintiffs' Oppositions by Connectu, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: 9/4/2007 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in Support re [82] & [84] Defendant's motion to strike demands in prayer for relief (Nici, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: 9/4/2007 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum of Points in support re [85] Defendant's motion for Summary Judgment. FILED UNDER SEAL (Nici, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 95 Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: 8/29/2007 Certificate of Service pursuant to LR 5.2
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg Of Confidential Under Seal Documents. (Chatterjee, I.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 94 Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: 8/29/2007 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT CORRECTED AMENDED JOINT REPORT PURSUANT TO JUDGE COLLINGSS by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Thefacebook LLC, Connectu, Inc., Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Chatterjee, I.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 93 Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: 8/29/2007 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re [91] MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(B)(6) filed by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Chatterjee, I.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 92 Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: 8/29/2007 Appendix/Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPENDIX/EXHIBIT re [85] [83] [89] [91] MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Claims for Breach of Contract, Breach of the Covenant of Good Faith and Fair Dealing, and Promissory Estoppel by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A and B)(Chatterjee, I.) Modified on 9/4/2007 (Nici, Richard). Modified on 9/4/2007 (Nici, Richard).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 91 Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: 8/29/2007, Terminated: 3/31/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(B)(6) by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)(Chatterjee, I.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 90 Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: 8/29/2007 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re [89] MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FED.R.CIV.P. 12(B)(6) filed by Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc.. (Chatterjee, I.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 89 Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: 8/29/2007, Terminated: 3/31/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FED.R.CIV.P. 12(B)(6) by Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)(Chatterjee, I.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 88 Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: 8/29/2007 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re [87] MOTION to Dismiss filed by Eduardo Saverin. (Hampton, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 87 Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: 8/29/2007, Terminated: 3/31/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss by Eduardo Saverin.(Hampton, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 86 Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: 8/29/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION re [85] MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Claims for Breach of Contract, Breach of the Covenant of Good Faith and Fair Dealing, and Promissory Estoppel by Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2# (3) Exhibit 3# (4) Exhibit 4# (5) Exhibit 5 - Notice of Manual Filing)(Chatterjee, I.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 85 Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: 8/29/2007, Terminated: 3/31/2008 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Claims for Breach of Contract, Breach of the Covenant of Good Faith and Fair Dealing, and Promissory Estoppel by Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for SJ)(Chatterjee, I.) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/4/2007 (Nici, Richard).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 84 Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: 8/29/2007, Terminated: 3/31/2008 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Strike Demands in Prayer For Relief in First Amended Complaint by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Strike)(Chatterjee, I.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 83 Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: 8/29/2007, Terminated: 3/31/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss by Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)(Chatterjee, I.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 82 Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: 8/29/2007, Terminated: 3/27/2008 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Defendants' Motion to Strike Demands by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # (1) Notice of Manual Filing# (2) Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal)(Chatterjee, I.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 81 Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: 8/29/2007, Terminated: 3/27/2008 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, and Exhibit 5 to the Declaration of Monte Cooper ISO Same by Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # (1) Notice of Manual Filing# (2) Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal)(Chatterjee, I.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 80 Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: 8/29/2007, Terminated: 3/27/2008 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Mark Zuckerberg's Motion to Dismiss by Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # (1) Notice of Manual Filing# (2) Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal)(Chatterjee, I.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 79 Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: 8/28/2007 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT - AMENDED JOINT REPORT by Connectu, Inc., Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Protocol)(Chatterjee, I.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: 8/24/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on July 25, 2007 before Judge Woodlock. Court Reporter: Pamela R. Owens. The original transcripts are maintained by the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter at pamowens1@earthlink.net or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: 8/24/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on July 25, 2007 before Judge Woodlock. Court Reporter: Marcia G. Patrisso. The original transcripts are maintained by the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter at 617/737-8728 or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 76 Filed: 8/17/2007, Entered: 8/17/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION --Supplemental Declaration of Meredith H. Schoenfeld in support of First Amended Complaint-- by Connectu, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 67# (2) Exhibit 76# (3) Exhibit 81# (4) Exhibit 84# (5) Exhibit 85)(Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 75 Filed: 8/17/2007, Entered: 8/17/2007 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Connectu, Inc. re [67] Notice (Other) Errata to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint (Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 74 Filed: 8/17/2007, Entered: 8/17/2007 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Connectu, Inc. --NOTICE OF FILING WITH CLERK'S OFFICE-- (Hornick, John) Modified on 8/20/2007 (Nici, Richard).Exhibits received 8/20/07.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 73 Filed: 8/17/2007, Entered: 8/17/2007, Terminated: 3/27/2008 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Assented to MOTION to Seal --ASSENTED-TO MOTION TO SEAL PLAINTIFFS' EXHIBITS TO SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF MEREDITH H. SHOENFELD by Connectu, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Robert B. Collings: Electronic NOTICE entered re [65] Joint Status Report. With respect to Part III "Additional Issues", since these matters were not the subject of motions to compel in the earlier action, the Court will take no action respecting them until a proper motion is filed in the instant case PRECEDED by the mandatory meet-and-confer procedure as required by both the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Robert B. Collings: The Court has reviewed the [65] Status Report regarding outstanding discovery issues filed July 28, 2007. The pleading is 14 pages long and recites a number of outstanding disputes. The Court has further reviewed the transcript of the July 25, 2007 hearing before Judge Woodlock in which the following statements are made: Mr. Hornick (at p. 32): "All of the discovery disputes we had with defendants, I believe, have been resolved based upon conversations we've had in the last two weeks." "With respect to the discovery we have provided, there are no motions to compel pending [e]xcept -- there are two, but I believe our agreement is that they are going to be withdrawn. The defendants have requested to meet and confer regarding some additional discovery they would like to have from us and we will give it to them to the extent that it exists." Mr. Chatterjee at p. 47: Our expectation, actually, is most, if not all, the motions are probably going to be taken off the table." The Court perceives a not so subtle "disconnect" between the representations made to Judge Woodlock and what is contained in the Joint Report. Accordingly, counsel are ORDERED to file, on or before the close of business on August 28, 2007, an UPDATED Joint Report which accurately represents as of that date whether there are any current discovery disputes, and if so, what they are. This Order does not apply to defendant Saverin in view of the stay of discovery which Judge Woodlock granted to him.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Set/Reset Answer Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Answer Deadlines for Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg, Eduardo Saverin: Answers to [71] AMENDED COMPLAINT against Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg, Eduardo Saverin, filed by Connectu, Inc. are due by 8/29/07. (Lovett, Jarrett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic ORDER entered granting [72] Motion for Extension of Time, response to First Amended Complaint due by 8/29/2007. (Woodlock, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 72 Filed: 8/10/2007, Entered: 8/10/2007, Terminated: 8/11/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to August 29, 2007 to Respond to First Amended Complaint by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Sutton, Theresa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 70 Filed: 8/9/2007, Entered: 8/9/2007 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Connectu, Inc. of Filing with the Clerk's Office (Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 69 Filed: 8/9/2007, Entered: 8/9/2007, Terminated: 3/27/2008 Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Assented to MOTION to Seal Document --Exhibit to the Declaration of Meredith H. Schoenfeld by Connectu, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 71 Filed: 8/8/2007, Entered: 8/9/2007 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT against Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg, Eduardo Saverin, filed by Connectu, Inc.. FILED UNDER SEAL WITH EXHIBITS 5,6,8,11,13,23,28,29,37-79,41,44,45,48-55,56A,57,59-64,67-71,78,80,81, 83 TO THE DECLARATION OF Meredith H. Schoenfeld IN SUPPORT OF Plaintiffs' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. (Nici, Richard) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/9/2007 (Nici, Richard). Modified on 8/14/2007 (Nici, Richard).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 68 Filed: 8/8/2007, Entered: 8/8/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Meredith H. Schoenfeld in support of First Amended Complaint by Connectu, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 part 1# (2) Exhibit 1 part 2# (3) Exhibit 1A# (4) Exhibit 2# (5) Exhibit 3 part 1# (6) Exhibit 3 part 2# (7) Exhibit 4# (8) Exhibit 5# (9) Exhibit 6# (10) Exhibit 7# (11) Exhibit 8# (12) Exhibit 9# (13) Exhibit 10# (14) Exhibit 11# (15) Exhibit 12# (16) Exhibit 13# (17) Exhibit 14# (18) Exhibit 15# (19) Exhibit 16# (20) Exhibit 17# (21) Exhibit 18# (22) Exhibit 19# (23) Exhibit 20# (24) Exhibit 21# (25) Exhibit 22# (26) Exhibit 23# (27) Exhibit 24# (28) Exhibit 25# (29) Exhibit 26# (30) Exhibit 27# (31) Exhibit 28# (32) Exhibit 29# (33) Exhibit 29A# (34) Exhibit 30# (35) Exhibit 31# (36) Exhibit 32# (37) Exhibit 33# (38) Exhibit 34# (39) Exhibit 35# (40) Exhibit 36# (41) Exhibit 37# (42) Exhibit 38# (43) Exhibit 39# (44) Exhibit 40# (45) Exhibit 41# (46) Exhibit 42# (47) Exhibit 43# (48) Exhibit 44# (49) Exhibit 45# (50) Exhibit 46# (51) Exhibit 47# (52) Exhibit 50# (53) Exhibit 51# (54) Exhibit 52# (55) Exhibit 53# (56) Exhibit 54# (57) Exhibit 55# (58) Exhibit 56# (59) Exhibit 56A# (60) Exhibit 56B# (61) Exhibit 56C# (62) Exhibit 56D# (63) Exhibit 56E# (64) Exhibit 56F# (65) Exhibit 56G# (66) Exhibit 56H# (67) Exhibit 56I# (68) Exhibit 56J# (69) Exhibit 58# (70) Exhibit 59# (71) Exhibit 60# (72) Exhibit 61# (73) Exhibit 62# (74) Exhibit 63# (75) Exhibit 64# (76) Exhibit 65# (77) Exhibit 66# (78) Exhibit 67# (79) Exhibit 68# (80) Exhibit 69# (81) Exhibit 70# (82) Exhibit 71# (83) Exhibit 72# (84) Exhibit 73# (85) Exhibit 74# (86) Exhibit 75# (87) Exhibit 76# (88) Exhibit 78# (89) Exhibit 80# (90) Exhibit 81# (91) Exhibit 82# (92) Exhibit 83)(Hornick, John) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/9/2007 (Nici, Richard).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 67 Filed: 8/8/2007, Entered: 8/8/2007 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Connectu, Inc. Notice of Filing with Clerk's Office (Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 66 Filed: 8/8/2007, Entered: 8/8/2007, Terminated: 3/27/2008 Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Assented to MOTION to Seal Document Assented-To Motion to Seal Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint and Exhibits to the Declaration of Meredith H. Schoenfeld by Connectu, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 65 Filed: 7/28/2007, Entered: 7/28/2007 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT Joint Report Re Discovery by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Connectu, Inc., Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg, Eduardo Saverin. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A: Proposed Protocol)(Sutton, Theresa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 64 Filed: 7/25/2007, Entered: 7/26/2007 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings Referred for: Full pretrial case management, not including dispositive motions(Lovett, Jarrett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Deadlines: Paintiff's Amended Complaint due by 8/8/2007. (Lovett, Jarrett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Motion Hearing held on 7/25/2007 re [16] MOTION to Dismiss filed by Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., [17] MOTION to Dismiss filed by Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Dustin Moskovitz, [30] MOTION to Dismiss filed by Eduardo Saverin: Court reserves ruling on outstanding Motions to Dismiss with leave to file Amended Complaint by August 8, 2007; the Complaint Plaintiff chooses to proceed upon as of August 8, 2007 shall be the governing pleading in the case and claims dismissed in response to the Motions to Dismiss may not be restated in this proceeding without leave of Court for good cause shown. If Plaintiff opts not to file Amended Complaint, Plaintiff may supplement briefing by August 8, 2007 and Defendants may file supplemental briefing on August 22, 2007. If Plaintiff files Amended Complaint, Defendants may file Motions to Dismiss by August 22, 2007. Plaintiff may then file Opposition brief of up to 40 pages by September 12, 2007. Defendants may reply by September 26,2007. Discovery will be stayed with respect to Defendant Saverin, provided he files affidavits as directed by the Court on the record; if Defendant Saverin's Motion to Dismiss is denied the stay will be lifted without further modification of the existing schedule. All other discovery will proceed as scheduled, under the direction of Magistrate Judge Collings. (Court Reporter Marie Cloonan) (Lovett, Jarrett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic ORDER entered reserving ruling on [30] Motion to Dismiss; granting [38] Motion for Leave to File; granting [39] Motion for Leave to File; granting [40] Motion for Leave to File; denying [43] Motion to Stay; granting [55] Motion for Leave to File; granting [58] Motion for Leave to File; reserving ruling on [16] Motion to Dismiss; reserving ruling on [17] Motion to Dismiss; reserving ruling on [18] Motion to Dismiss (Woodlock, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing on Motion [17] MOTION to Dismiss, [18] MOTION to Dismiss, [16] MOTION to Dismiss, [30] MOTION to Dismiss : Motion Hearing set for 7/25/2007 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Lovett, Jarrett)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 63 Filed: 6/15/2007, Entered: 6/15/2007 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Connectu, Inc. - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF CONNECTU'S MOTION FOR CONTEMPT (Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 62 Filed: 6/12/2007, Entered: 6/13/2007 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : ORDER entered REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings. Referred for: All pretrial proceedings, excluding dispositive motions.(Rynne, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 61 Filed: 6/12/2007, Entered: 6/12/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Robert B. Collings : PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: NOTICE OF MOTIONS FILED BY PLAINTIFF CONNECTU REQUIRING RESOLUTION (#8) entered. (Dolan, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 60 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: 6/8/2007 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg (NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION) (Bauer, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Scheduling Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Scheduling Conference held on 6/8/2007. Motion to Stay is denied. Motion hearing regarding motions to dismiss is set for 7/25/07 at 2:30 p.m. Any attorney not admitted to practice in Massachusetts USDC must file a motion to appear pro hac vice. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice are not allowed to sign pleadings until they have registered from CM/ECF. Discovery in 04-11923 may be used in this case. Depositions will be limited to 18. Parties can anticipate an Order from Magistrate Judge Collings regarding previous motions filed in 04-11923. Within 5 days, counsel shall report to the court whether they are still pressing Bill of Costs and Motion for contempt filed in 04-11923. (Court Reporter Marie Cloonan.) (Rynne, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 59 Filed: 6/6/2007, Entered: 6/6/2007 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Eduardo Saverin.(Hampton, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 58 Filed: 6/6/2007, Entered: 6/6/2007, Terminated: 7/25/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Facebook Defs' Reply ISO Mtn to Stay Pending Appeal to 1st Circ. by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B)(Sutton, Theresa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Notice of Rescheduling
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING:Scheduling Conference reset for 6/8/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Rynne, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Notice Cancelling Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Scheduling Conference. Scheduling conference previously set for 5/31/07 is CANCELED. Notice will issue setting new date for scheduling conference. (Rynne, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 57 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg of Certification of Conference Under Local Rule 16.1(D)(3) (Chatterjee, I.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 56 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007 Opposition to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Opposition re [43] MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Connectu, LLC's Appeal to the First Circuit of Judge Woodlock's Order of Dismissal in Related Case No. 1:04-cv-11923-DPW filed by Connectu, Inc.. (Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Order on Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic ORDER entered denying [52] Motion to Continue (Nici, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 55 Filed: 5/24/2007, Entered: 5/24/2007, Terminated: 7/25/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Reply ISO Motion to Dismiss Claims Against Saverin by Eduardo Saverin. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Reply to ISO Motion to Dismiss Claims Against Saverin# (2) Exhibit [Proposed Order] Granting Motion for Leave to File Reply ISO Motion to Dismiss Claims Against Saverin)(Hampton, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 54 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: 5/23/2007 Joint statement of counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JOINT STATEMENT of counsel - LOCAL RULE 16.1(D) JOINT STATEMENT. (Attachments: # (1) ConnectU Certification)(Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : ADMITTED ATTORNEYS MUST REGISTER FOR CM/ECF.Electronic ORDER entered granting [46] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Bhanu Sadasivan for Eduardo Saverin, Nathan E Shafroth for Eduardo Saverin, Annette L. Hurst for Eduardo Saverin, Robert B. Hawk for Eduardo Saverin; granting [48] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Bhanu Sadasivan for Eduardo Saverin, Nathan E Shafroth for Eduardo Saverin, Annette L. Hurst for Eduardo Saverin, Robert B. Hawk for Eduardo Saverin; granting [49] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Bhanu Sadasivan for Eduardo Saverin, Nathan E Shafroth for Eduardo Saverin, Annette L. Hurst for Eduardo Saverin, Robert B. Hawk for Eduardo Saverin; granting [50] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Bhanu Sadasivan for Eduardo Saverin, Nathan E Shafroth for Eduardo Saverin, Annette L. Hurst for Eduardo Saverin, Robert B. Hawk for Eduardo Saverin RECEIPT# 80226 $200(Nici, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Filing Fee/Payment Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Filing fee: $ 100.00, receipt number 79670 for motions # 20-21 ( Neel Chatterjee and Monte cooper) (Diskes, Sheila)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Filing Fee/Payment Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filing fee: $ 50.00, receipt number 79670 for motion # 19 ( Theresa Sutton) (Diskes, Sheila)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Filing Fee/Payment Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filing fee: $ 50.00, receipt number 80226 for motion # 49 ( atty Hurst) (Diskes, Sheila)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Filing Fee/Payment Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filing fee: $ 50.00, receipt number 80226 motion #48 ( Atty Shafroth) (Diskes, Sheila)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Filing Fee/Payment Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Filing fee: $ 50.00, receipt number 80226 for motion # 46 ( Atty Sadasivan) (Diskes, Sheila)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Filing Fee/Payment Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filing fee: $ 50.00, receipt number 80150 for motion # 42 ( G. Hopkin) (Diskes, Sheila)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Filing Fee/Payment Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Filing fee: $ 50.00, receipt number 80226 for motion # 50 ( atty Hawk) (Diskes, Sheila)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filing Fee/Payment Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filing fee: $ 50.00, receipt number 80150 for motion #41 ( Yvonne P. Greer) (Diskes, Sheila)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 53 Filed: 5/18/2007, Entered: 5/18/2007 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Opposition re [52] MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference to June 12, 2007 filed by Connectu, Inc.. (Esquenet, Margaret)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 52 Filed: 5/18/2007, Entered: 5/18/2007, Terminated: 5/29/2007 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference to June 12, 2007 by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg.(Bauer, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 51 Filed: 5/18/2007, Entered: 5/18/2007 Proposed Document(s) submitted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Document(s) submitted by Eduardo Saverin. Document received: Proposed Order on Assented-To Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Bhanu K. Sadasivan. (Attachments: # (1))(Hampton, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 50 Filed: 5/18/2007, Entered: 5/18/2007, Terminated: 5/23/2007 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Robert B. Hawk by Eduardo Saverin. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Robert B. Hawk, Esquire in Support of Assented-To Motion for Admissoin Pro Hac Vice# (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Hampton, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 49 Filed: 5/18/2007, Entered: 5/18/2007, Terminated: 5/23/2007 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Annette L. Hurst by Eduardo Saverin. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Annette L. HUrst, Esq. in Support of Assented-To Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice# (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Hampton, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 48 Filed: 5/18/2007, Entered: 5/18/2007, Terminated: 5/23/2007 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Nathan E. Shafroth by Eduardo Saverin. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Nathan E. Shafroth in Support of Assented-to Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice# (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Hampton, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 47 Filed: 5/18/2007, Entered: 5/18/2007 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Bhanu K. Sadasivan in Support re [46] Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Bhanu K. Sadasivan filed by Eduardo Saverin. (Hampton, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 46 Filed: 5/18/2007, Entered: 5/18/2007, Terminated: 5/23/2007 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Bhanu K. Sadasivan by Eduardo Saverin.(Hampton, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 45 Filed: 5/16/2007, Entered: 5/16/2007 Notice (Other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of Consolutation by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg re [43] MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Connectu, LLC's Appeal to the First Circuit of Judge Woodlock's Order of Dismissal in Related Case No. 1:04-cv-11923-DPW CERTIFICATION PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 7.1 (a)(2) (Chatterjee, I.) Modified on 5/17/2007 (Nici, Richard).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 44 Filed: 5/16/2007, Entered: 5/16/2007 Proposed Document(s) submitted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Document(s) submitted by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg, Eduardo Saverin. Document received: Facebook's Motion to Stay. (Chatterjee, I.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 43 Filed: 5/16/2007, Entered: 5/16/2007, Terminated: 7/25/2007 Motion to StayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Connectu, LLC's Appeal to the First Circuit of Judge Woodlock's Order of Dismissal in Related Case No. 1:04-cv-11923-DPW by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg, Eduardo Saverin.(Chatterjee, I.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 42 Filed: 5/16/2007, Entered: 5/16/2007, Terminated: 5/16/2007 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of G. Hopkins Guy, III by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of G. Hopkins Guy III)(Oczek, Jeremy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 41 Filed: 5/16/2007, Entered: 5/16/2007, Terminated: 5/16/2007 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Yvonne P. Greer by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Declaration of Yvonne Greer)(Oczek, Jeremy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : ADMITTED ATTORNEYS MUST REGISTER FOR CM/ECF. Electronic ORDER entered granting [41] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added G. Hopkins Guy, III for Dustin Moskovitz and Andrew McCollum, Yvonne P Greer for Dustin Moskovitz,Andrew McCollum,Christopher Hughes,Thefacebook LLC,Facebook, Inc.,Mark Zuckerberg; granting [42] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added G. Hopkins Guy, III for Dustin Moskovitz and Andrew McCollum, Yvonne P Greer for Dustin Moskovitz,Andrew McCollum,Christopher Hughes,Thefacebook LLC,Facebook, Inc.,Mark Zuckerberg (Nici, Richard)Receipt #80150 $100
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 40 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: 5/14/2007, Terminated: 7/25/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Moskovitz, McCollum and Hughes Reply to PL's Oppo to Mtn to Dismiss by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Chatterjee, I.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 39 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: 5/14/2007, Terminated: 7/25/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File to File Zuckerberg's Reply to PL's Oppo to Mtns to Dismiss by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Chatterjee, I.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 38 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: 5/14/2007, Terminated: 7/25/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File to File Facebook and TheFacebook's Reply to PL's Oppo to Mtn to Dismiss by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Chatterjee, I.) Modified on 5/15/2007 (Hassett, Kathy).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 37 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: 5/8/2007 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel P. Kaufman on behalf of Connectu, Inc. (Kaufman, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 36 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: 5/7/2007 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Opposition re [30] MOTION to Dismiss - - CONNECTU INC.'S OPPOSITION TO SAVERIN'S MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Connectu, Inc.. (Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 35 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: 5/7/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION re [34] Opposition to Motion - DECLARATION OF MARGARET A. ESQUENET IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S CONSOLIDATED OPPOSITION TO FACEBOOK DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS by Connectu, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B)(Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 34 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: 5/7/2007 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Opposition re [16] MOTION to Dismiss, [17] MOTION to Dismiss, [18] MOTION to Dismiss - - CONNECTU INC.'S CONSOLIDATED OPPOSITION TO FACEBOOK DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS filed by Connectu, Inc.. (Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 33 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: 5/7/2007 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg of Joining Defendant Eduardo Saverin's Motion To Dismiss Complaint (Sutton, Theresa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 32 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: 5/7/2007 Notice of Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Scheduling Conference: Scheduling Conference set for 5/31/2007 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock and Magistrate Judge Robert B. Collings. (Rynne, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 31 Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: 5/3/2007 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re [30] MOTION to Dismiss filed by Eduardo Saverin. (Hampton, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 30 Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: 5/3/2007, Terminated: 3/31/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss by Eduardo Saverin.(Hampton, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 29 Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: 5/3/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION re [28] Response - DECLARATION OF MEREDITH H. SCHOENFELD IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO FACEBOOK DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO NOTICE OF MOTIONS FILED BY PLAINTIFF CONNECTU REQUIRING RESOLUTION by Connectu, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 28 Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: 5/3/2007 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Response by Connectu, Inc. to [8] Notice (Other) - CONNECTU'S OPPOSITION TO FACEBOOK DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO NOTICE OF MOTIONS FILED BY PLAINTIFF CONNECTU REQUIRING RESOLUTION. (Hornick, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic ORDER entered granting [13] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Margaret A. Esquenet for Connectu, Inc., John F. Hornick for Connectu, Inc., Meredith H. Schoenfeld for Connectu, Inc. (Nici, Richard)Receipt# 79584 $150
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic ORDER entered granting [19] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Theresa A. Sutton for Dustin Moskovitz and Andrew McCollum, I. Neel Chatterjee for Dustin Moskovitz and Andrew McCollum, Monte Cooper for Dustin Moskovitz and Andrew McCollum, granting [20] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Theresa A. Sutton for Dustin Moskovitz and Andrew McCollum, I. Neel Chatterjee for Dustin Moskovitz and Andrew McCollum, Monte Cooper for Dustin Moskovitz and Andrew McCollum, granting [21] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Theresa A. Sutton for Dustin Moskovitz and Andrew McCollum, I. Neel Chatterjee for Dustin Moskovitz and Andrew McCollum, Monte Cooper for Dustin Moskovitz and Andrew McCollum receipt # 79670 $150 (Nici, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic ORDER entered granting [24] Motion for Leave to File ONE CONSOLIDATED OPPOSITION TO MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION. Memorandum not to exceed 40 pages. (Rynne, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 27 Filed: 4/26/2007, Entered: 4/26/2007 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Gordon P. Katz on behalf of Eduardo Saverin (Katz, Gordon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 26 Filed: 4/26/2007, Entered: 4/26/2007 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel K. Hampton on behalf of Eduardo Saverin (Hampton, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 25 Filed: 4/26/2007, Entered: 4/26/2007 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Connectu, Inc. re [24] MOTION for Leave to File ONE CONSOLIDATED OPPOSITION TO FACEBOOK DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS; AND MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION --NOTICE OF CONSENT BY FACEBOOK DEFENDANTS (McConchie, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 24 Filed: 4/25/2007, Entered: 4/25/2007, Terminated: 4/27/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File ONE CONSOLIDATED OPPOSITION TO FACEBOOK DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS; AND MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION by Connectu, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(McConchie, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 23 Filed: 4/25/2007, Entered: 4/25/2007 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Response by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg to [8] Notice (Other) Response to "Notice of Motions Filed By Plaintiff ConnectU Requiring Resolution". (Bauer, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 22 Filed: 4/24/2007, Entered: 4/24/2007 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg re [17] MOTION to Dismiss, [18] MOTION to Dismiss, [16] MOTION to Dismiss of Combined Certification Pursuant to Rule 7.1(a) (Bauer, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 21 Filed: 4/24/2007, Entered: 4/24/2007, Terminated: 5/2/2007 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Monte M.F. Cooper by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Monte M.F. Cooper)(Oczek, Jeremy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 20 Filed: 4/24/2007, Entered: 4/24/2007, Terminated: 5/2/2007 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of I. Neel Chatterjee by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of I. Neel Chatterjee)(Oczek, Jeremy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 19 Filed: 4/24/2007, Entered: 4/24/2007, Terminated: 5/2/2007 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Theresa A. Sutton by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Theresa A Sutton)(Oczek, Jeremy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 18 Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: 4/23/2007, Terminated: 9/5/2007 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum in support of MOTION to Dismiss by Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Bauer, Steven) Modified on 7/13/2007 (Nici, Richard).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 17 Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: 4/23/2007, Terminated: 3/31/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Bauer, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 16 Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: 4/23/2007, Terminated: 3/31/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss by Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Bauer, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Douglas P. Woodlock : Electronic ORDER entered denying [10] Motion for Extension of Time to respond to complaint. (Rynne, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 4/19/2007, Entered: 4/19/2007 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Supplemental Opposition re [10] MOTION for Extension of Time to 05/09/2007 to TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT - - ADDENDUM TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD filed by Connectu, Inc.. (McConchie, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 4/19/2007, Entered: 4/19/2007 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed Andrew McCollum served on 4/11/2007, answer due 5/1/2007. (McConchie, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 13 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: 4/18/2007, Terminated: 5/2/2007 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of John F. Hornick, Margaret A. Esquenet, and Meredith H. Schoenfeld by Connectu, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Margaret A. Esquenet# (2) Declaration of John F. Hornick# (3) Declaration of Meredith H. Schoenfeld)(Tighe, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 12 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: 4/17/2007 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Opposition re [10] MOTION for Extension of Time to 05/09/2007 to TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT filed by Connectu, Inc.. (Tighe, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 11 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: 4/17/2007 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy P. Oczek on behalf of Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg (Oczek, Jeremy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: 4/17/2007, Terminated: 4/23/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to 05/09/2007 to TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT by Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg.(Bauer, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 9 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: 4/11/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION re [8] Notice (Other) - DECLARATION OF MEREDITH H. SCHOENFELD IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTIONS FILED BY PLAINTIFF CONNECTU REQUIRING RESOLUTION by Connectu, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B)(Tighe, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 8 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: 4/11/2007 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Connectu, Inc. - NOTICE OF MOTIONS FILED BY PLAINTIFF CONNECTU REQUIRING RESOLUTION (Tighe, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: 4/11/2007 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed Mark Zuckerberg served on 4/2/2007, answer due 4/23/2007. (Tighe, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: 4/11/2007 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed Christopher Hughes served on 4/9/2007, answer due 4/30/2007. (Tighe, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: 4/11/2007 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed Dustin Moskovitz served on 4/7/2007, answer due 4/27/2007. (Tighe, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: 4/11/2007 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed Thefacebook LLC served on 4/2/2007, answer due 4/23/2007. (Tighe, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: 4/11/2007 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed Facebook, Inc. served on 4/2/2007, answer due 4/23/2007. (Tighe, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 3/28/2007, Entered: 3/28/2007 Report on the filing/termination of copyright case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPORT on the filing of copyright case. (Filo, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 3/28/2007, Entered: 3/28/2007 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT against all defendants , filed by Connectu, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet # (2) Category Sheet# (3) Exhibit A# (4) Exhibit B)(Filo, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Filing Fee/Payment Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Filing fee: $ 350.00, receipt number 79064 for [1] Complaint (Filo, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Summons Issued as to Dustin Moskovitz, Andrew McCollum, Christopher Hughes, Thefacebook LLC, Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg, Eduardo Saverin. (Filo, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Notice of Case Assignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Douglas P. Woodlock assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Collings (Filo, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 376 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?