Samia Companies LLC v. MRI Software LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:11-cv-12329

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 7, 2019 at 1:22 AM ST (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Samia Companies LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Finnegan +1 617 201 9331 +1 617 783 1082 rf.uxb@verizon.net
No Logo Mri Software LLC, Counter-Claimant
v.
No Logo Mri Software LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth M. DiPardo +1 617 570 1471 edipardo@goodwinprocter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shilepsky O'Connell Casey Hartley Michon Yelen, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick J. Hannon +1 617 723 8000 phannon@shilepsky.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sugarman, Rogers, Barshak & Cohen, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William L. Boesch +1 617 227 3030 +1 617 523 4001 boesch@srbc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian M. LaMacchia +1 617 748 3688 brian.lamacchia@usdoj.gov
No Logo Samia Companies LLC, Counter-Defendant
No Logo Judge Jennifer C. Boal, Mediator
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1446
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
  Entries (103) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE(Patch, Christine) (Entered: 01/28/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None
    STIPULATION of Dismissal by MRI Software LLC. (Boesch, William) (Entered: 01/26/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None
      ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing. Parties having reported the matter settled, the Final Pretrial Conference scheduled for 1/8/15 and Bench Trial scheduled for 1/12/15 are canceled. (Patch, Christine) (Entered: 12/23/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None
        STATUS REPORT by Samia Companies LLC and by MRI Software LLC. (Boesch, William) (Entered: 12/22/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None
          Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 12/22/2014 (Patch, Christine) (Entered: 12/16/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Patrick J. Hannon (Hannon, Patrick) (Entered: 10/31/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
              ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/8/2015 03:30 PM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. (Patch, Christine) (Entered: 10/24/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 98 Motion to Continue Bench Trial set for 1/12/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. (Patch, Christine) (Entered: 10/24/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: None
                  Joint MOTION to Continue Bench Trial to January 2015 by Samia Companies and by MRI Software LLC.(Boesch, William) (Entered: 10/23/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                    Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. "For the foregoing reasons, defendant's motion for summary judgment (Docket No. 73) is allowed, in part, and denied, in part. Claims I, III, V, VII and VIII asserted in the complaint filed on November 15, 2011 (Docket No. 1, Ex. 1) are dismissed. So ordered." (Patch, Christine) (Entered: 10/10/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING Bench Trial set for 11/3/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/30/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. (Patch, Christine) (Entered: 09/30/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None
                        ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing. The Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/30/14 at 3:00PM and the Bench Trial set for 10/6/2014 at 9:00AM are CANCELED and will be rescheduled by the Court at a later date. (Moore, Kellyann) (Entered: 09/29/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None
                          Proposed Findings of Fact by Samia Companies LLC. (Finnegan, Robert) (Entered: 09/08/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None
                            Trial Witness List by MRI Software LLC. (Boesch, William) (Entered: 09/08/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None
                              Proposed Findings of Fact by MRI Software LLC. (Boesch, William) (Entered: 09/08/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None
                                Exhibit List by MRI Software LLC.. (Boesch, William) (Entered: 09/08/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: None
                                  REPLY to Response to 73 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by MRI Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit L - Deposition of Lynn Mark, # 2 Exhibit M - Deposition of Chris Patten, # 3 Exhibit N - Samia's Answers to Interrogatories)(Boesch, William) (Entered: 08/21/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Dambrosio, Jolyne) (Entered: 08/14/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: denying 71 Motion to Compel; Motion Hearing held on 8/14/2014 re 71 MOTION to Compel Document Production filed by Samia Companies LLC. Case called; USMJ Dein hears argument and denied motion. (Court Reporter: Digital Recording - For transcripts or CDs contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov.) (Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 08/14/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 8/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING Bench Trial set for 10/6/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/30/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. (Patch, Christine) (Entered: 08/11/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: None
                                          Opposition re 73 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Samia Companies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-4)(Finnegan, Robert) (Entered: 08/07/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. PROCEDURAL ORDER re pretrial/trial: Proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law, and Exhibit/Witness Lists due by 9/8/2014; objections to exhibit/Witness Lists due by 9/15/2014.(Patch, Christine) (Entered: 08/06/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ELECTRONIC NOTICE RESETTING HEARING on 71 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Document Production: Motion Hearing rescheduled for 8/14/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 15 before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Dambrosio, Jolyne) (Entered: 07/23/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 82 Plaintiff's Assented to Motion to Continue Hearing. (Dambrosio, Jolyne) (Entered: 07/23/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                  MOTION to Continue Hearing on Motion to Compel to 8/12/14 by Samia Companies LLC.(Finnegan, Robert) (Entered: 07/22/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ELECTRONIC NOTICE SETTING HEARING on 71 Plaintiff's MOTION to Compel Document Production: Motion Hearing set for 7/29/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom 15 before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Dambrosio, Jolyne) (Entered: 07/22/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                      Opposition re 71 MOTION to Compel Document Production filed by MRI Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A -- Hearing Transcript)(Boesch, William) (Entered: 07/17/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          Transcript of Motion Hearing held on September 12, 2013, before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. The Transcript may be purchased through Karen Aveyard at 978-466-9383, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name: No Reporter Used. Digital Recording transcribed by Karen Aveyard. Redaction Request due 8/5/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/15/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/13/2014. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick J. Hannon on behalf of MRI Software LLC (Hannon, Patrick) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                              ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for 75 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1, 73 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 74 Memorandum in Support of Motion. Counsel who filed these documents are requested to submit a courtesy copy of them to the Clerk's Office. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy and reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF. (Patch, Christine) (Entered: 07/09/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re 73 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by MRI Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Contract, # 2 Exhibit B, Deposition of Edward Saab, # 3 Exhibit C, Proposed Work Authorization 27736, # 4 Exhibit D, Work Authorization 27661, # 5 Exhibit E, E-mail chain between Attorney Robert Finnegan and David Morgan, # 6 Exhibit F, Invoices No. CS026548 (03/30/10) and CS027333 (04/29/10), # 7 Exhibit G, Letter dated August 24, 2010 from Attorney Robert Finnegan, # 8 Exhibit H, Amendment #1 to Master Licenses and Services Agreement, # 9 Exhibit I, Letter dated July 7, 2010 from MRI to Samia, # 10 Exhibit J, Letter dated September 29, 2010 from Samia to MRI, # 11 Exhibit K, Samia Account Statement)(Boesch, William) (Entered: 07/08/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re 73 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by MRI Software LLC. (Boesch, William) (Entered: 07/08/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                    MOTION for Summary Judgment by MRI Software LLC.(Boesch, William) (Entered: 07/08/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein Referred for: Events Only (e). Motions referred: 71 MOTION to Compel Document Production. (Patch, Christine) Motions referred to Judith G. Dein. (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                        MOTION to Compel Document Production by Samia Companies LLC.(Finnegan, Robert) (Entered: 07/03/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          REPORT of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider: Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal reports that this case did not settle. This case should be restored to your trial list. (York, Steve) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: Telephone Conference held on 6/2/2014. The Court reviewed preliminary matters with the parties prior to the upcoming mediation. (Court Reporter: SEALED Digital Recording - For transcripts or CDs the parties should first seek leave of the Court. If the request is granted, the parties should then contact Deborah Scalfani by email at (deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov.) (Attorneys present: Finnegan for plaintiff; Boesch for defendant;) (York, Steve) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                              Set/Reset Deadlines: Dispositive Motions due by 7/8/2014, oppositions by 8/8/14. (Patch, Christine) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 66 Motion for Modification of Schedule for Dispositive Motions. (Patch, Christine) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                  Joint MOTION to Modify Schedule for Dispositive Motions by Samia Companies LLC and by MRI Software LLC.(Boesch, William) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. The Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing has been reset for 6/6/2014 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 14 before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. There will be a Telephone Conference set for 6/2/2014 at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 14 before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (York, Steve) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ENDORSED ORDER entered granting 61 Motion to Continue. "Motion allowed; trial is rescheduled to commence on Mon., Sept. 22, 2014 at 9:00 A.M.; the pretrial conference will be on Thursday, Sept. 18 2014, at 3:00 P.M." Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/18/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. Jury Trial set for 9/22/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. (Moore, Kellyann) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: Telephone Conference held on 4/17/2014. The Court reviewed preliminary matters with the parties prior to the upcoming mediation. The parties requested a continuation of the scheduled mediation hearing. The Court proposed new dates with the parties and directed them to inform the clerk of their client's availability by close of business on 4/18/2014. (Court Reporter: SEALED Digital Recording - For transcripts or CDs the parties should first seek leave of the Court. If the request is granted, the parties should then contact Deborah Scalfani by email at (deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov.) (Attorneys present: Finnegan for plaintiff; Boesch for defendant;) (York, Steve) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: Telephone Conference held on 3/31/2014. The Court reviewed preliminary matters with the parties prior to the upcoming mediation. The Court sets a further Telephone Conference for 4/17/2014 at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 14 before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Court Reporter: SEALED Digital Recording - For transcripts or CDs the parties should first seek leave of the Court. If the request is granted, the parties should then contact Deborah Scalfani by email at (deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov.) (Attorneys present: Finnegan for plaintiff; Boesch for defendant;) (York, Steve) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                            MOTION to Continue Bench Trial by Samia Companies LLC.(Finnegan, Robert) (Entered: 03/10/2014)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. A Telephone Conference is set for 3/31/2014 at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 14 before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. A further Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing is set for 4/23/2014 at 10:00 a.m in Courtroom 14 before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (York, Steve) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                REPORT of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider: Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal reports this case did not settle but progress was made. Further sessions will be scheduled. (York, Steve) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: Telephone Conference held on 2/19/2014. The Court reviewed preliminary matters with the parties prior to the upcoming mediation. (Court Reporter: SEALED Digital Recording - For transcripts or CDs the parties should first seek leave of the Court. If the request is granted, the parties should then contact Deborah Scalfani by email at (deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov.)(Attorneys present: Finnegan for plaintiff; Boesch for defendant;) (York, Steve) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING. The Telephone Conference has been rescheduled for 2/19/2014 at 12:00 p.m. in Courtroom 14 before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. Please Note: TIME CHANGE ONLY (York, Steve) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Fact Discovery to be completed by 2/28/2014; experts designated and Rule 26 Reports exchanged by 3/31/2014; expert depositions completed by 4/30/14; dispositive Motions due by 5/15/2014, oppositions by 6/15/14. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/31/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. Jury Trial set for 8/4/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton.(Patch, Christine) (Entered: 01/10/2014)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 51 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS OF TIME WILL BE ALLOWED. (Patch, Christine) (Entered: 01/10/2014)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Assented to MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order by MRI Software LLC.(Boesch, William) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ELECTRONIC ORDER GRANTING 49 Motion to Continue Mediation. Plaintiff reportedly opposes the Defendants' request to continue the mediation until after discovery is completed. The Court finds that it would not be fruitful to conduct the mediation at this time, as the Defendant believes that it does not have sufficient information. The Court reschedules the mediation to February 24, 2014 at 10:00 a.m. Counsel and principals are directed to be present and have full settlement authority. Each party must submit a brief (no more than 5 pages) mediation memorandum that includes a discussion of (1) the merits of the case (both strengths and weaknesses); (2) damages or other relief sought by the parties; (3) the status of discovery; and (4) the status of the parties' settlement discussions. The memoranda should be submitted BY HAND, E-MAIL to (steve_york@mad.uscourts.gov), OR MAIL WITH THE COURT no later than five (5) business days prior to the mediation and marked "Confidential - Not for Docketing." In the event that any party believes that the case is not ripe for mediation, or the date poses a serious conflict, counsel are to notify opposing counsel and call the deputy clerk at 617-748-9238 as soon as possible. Prior to the mediation, there will be a Telephone Conference set for February 19, 2014 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 14 before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. The clerk will provide the call in information to all parties by email, one day prior to the upcoming telephone conference. (York, Steve) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                              MOTION to Continue Mediation to Feb. 1, 2014 or later by MRI Software LLC.(Boesch, William) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Dambrosio, Jolyne) (Entered: 09/25/2013)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered withdrawing 36 MRI Software's MOTION to Compel Production of Software System, and cancelling the hearing scheduled for 9/30/13 in accordance with Docket No. 46. (Dambrosio, Jolyne) (Modified on 9/25/2013 to add docket text (Dambrosio, Jolyne).) (Entered: 09/25/2013)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    STIPULATION re 36 MOTION to Compel Production of Software System for Inspection, 44 Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings, 43 Notice of Hearing on Motion by Samia Companies and by MRI Software LLC. (Boesch, William) (Entered: 09/24/2013)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: Motion Hearing held on 9/12/2013 re 33 MOTION to Quash Deposition of Robert Finnegan filed by Samia Companies LLC. USMJ Dein hears arguments and grants motion. (Court Reporter: Digital Recording - For transcripts or CDs contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov.)(Attorneys present: Finnegan and Boesch) (Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines as to 36 MOTION to Compel Production of Software System for Inspection. Responses due by 9/24/2013 (Moore, Kellyann) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC NOTICE SETTING HEARING ON 36 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Production of Software System for Inspection: Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 15 before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Dambrosio, Jolyne) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER entered granting without prejudice 33 Plaintiff's Motion to Quash Deposition of Robert Finnegan. (Dambrosio, Jolyne) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 40 Plaintiff's Motion to Postpone Hearing. A schedule for briefing and argument on Defendant's Motion to Compel shall be set at the 9/12/13 hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Quash. (Dambrosio, Jolyne) (Entered: 09/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                MOTION to Continue Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Compel to after 9/12/13 hearing by Samia Companies LLC.(Finnegan, Robert) (Entered: 08/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on 33 Plaintiff's MOTION to Quash and 36 Defendant's MOTION to Compel: Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 15 before Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Dambrosio, Jolyne) (Entered: 08/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    MOTIONS 36 MOTION to Compel Production of Software System for Inspection (Moore, Kellyann) Motions referred to Judith G. Dein. (Entered: 08/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re 36 MOTION to Compel Production of Software System for Inspection filed by MRI Software LLC. (Boesch, William) (Entered: 08/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Compel Production of Software System for Inspection by MRI Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Master License and Services Agreement), # 2 Exhibit B (Samia Initial Disclosure), # 3 Exhibit C (Samia Answers to Ints), # 4 Exhibit D (Samia Responses to Requests for Production))(Boesch, William) (Entered: 08/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Opposition re 33 MOTION to Quash Deposition of Robert Finnegan filed by MRI Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (02 11 10 EMail), # 2 Exhibit B (02 12 10 EMail), # 3 Exhibit C (03 08 10 EMail), # 4 Exhibit D (04 06 10 EMail), # 5 Exhibit E (04 26 & 27 10 EMail), # 6 Exhibit F (05 05 10 EMail), # 7 Exhibit G (Samia Responses to Requests for Production))(Boesch, William) (Entered: 08/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein Referred for: Events Only (e). Motions referred: 33 MOTION to Quash Deposition of Robert Finnegan. (Patch, Christine) Motions referred to Judith G. Dein. (Entered: 08/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Quash Deposition of Robert Finnegan by Samia Companies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum In Support, # 2 Memorandum Exhibits)(Finnegan, Robert) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING The Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing has been rescheduled for 11/22/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14 before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. Counsel and principals are directed to be present and have full settlement authority. Each party must submit a brief (no more than 5 pages) mediation memorandum that includes a discussion of (1) the merits of the case (both strengths and weaknesses); (2) damages or other relief sought by the parties; (3) the status of discovery; and (4) the status of the parties' settlement discussions. The memoranda should be submitted BY HAND, E-MAIL to (steve_york@mad.uscourts.gov), OR MAIL WITH THE COURT no later than five (5) business days prior to the mediation and marked "Confidential - Not for Docketing." In the event that any party believes that the case is not ripe for mediation, or the date poses a serious conflict, counsel are to notify opposing counsel and call the deputy clerk at 617-748-9238 as soon as possible. Prior to the mediation, there will be a Telephone Conference set for 11/19/2013 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 14 before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. The clerk will provide the call in information to all parties by email, one day prior to the upcoming telephone conference. (York, Steve) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 30 Joint Motion Postpone Mediation. (York, Steve) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION Postpone Mediation by Samia Companies and by MRI Software LLC.(Boesch, William) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by MRI Software LLC. (Boesch, William) (Entered: 01/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Finnegan, Robert) (Entered: 01/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. An Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing is set for 8/9/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14 before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. Counsel and principals are directed to be present and have full settlement authority. Each party must submit a brief (no more than 5 pages) mediation memorandum that includes a discussion of (1) the merits of the case (both strengths and weaknesses); (2) damages or other relief sought by the parties; (3) the status of discovery; and (4) the status of the parties' settlement discussions. The memoranda should be submitted BY HAND, E-MAIL to (steve_york@mad.uscourts.gov), OR MAIL WITH THE COURT no later than five (5) business days prior to the mediation and marked "Confidential - Not for Docketing." In the event that any party believes that the case is not ripe for mediation, or the date poses a serious conflict, counsel are to notify opposing counsel and call the deputy clerk at 617-748-9238 as soon as possible. Prior to the mediation. There will be a Telephone Conference set for 8/6/2014 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 14 before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. The clerk will provide the call in information to all parties by email, one day prior to the upcoming telephone conference. (York, Steve) (Entered: 12/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution for Mediation: August, 2013.(Patch, Christine) (Entered: 12/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: Status Conference held on 12/20/2012: Automatic discovery to be completed by 1/15/13; Amendments and/or Supplements to the Pleadings due by 3/31/2013; written discovery served by 4/30/13, answered by 5/31/13; fact Discovery to be completed by 7/31/2013; experts designated and Rule 26 Reports exchanged by 9/30/13; expert depositions to be completed by 11/15/13; dispositive Motions due by 12/31/2013, oppositions by 1/31/14; Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/19/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. Jury Trial set for 4/7/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. Case to be referred to Mediation program: August, 2013. (Court Reporter: Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@yahoo.com.)(Attorneys present: Finnegan, Boesch) (Patch, Christine) (Entered: 12/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 23 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Elizabeth M. DiPardo and Brian M. LaMacchia terminated (Patch, Christine) (Entered: 12/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Brian M. LaMacchia and Elizabeth M. DiPardo) (Unopposed) by MRI Software LLC.(LaMacchia, Brian) (Entered: 12/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING Status Conference set for 12/20/2012 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. (Patch, Christine) (Entered: 12/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Status Conference set for 12/19/2012 03:15 PM in Courtroom 4 before Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton. (Patch, Christine) (Entered: 10/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Samia's ANSWER to Counterclaim of MRI by Samia Companies LLC.(Finnegan, Robert) (Entered: 10/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Samia Companies LLC by MRI Software LLC.(Boesch, William) (Entered: 10/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by William L. Boesch on behalf of MRI Software LLC (Boesch, William) (Entered: 10/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 17 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ORDER entered. ORDER ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS Action on motion: ; granting in part and denying in part 8 Motion to Dismiss; adopting Report and Recommendations re 12 Report and Recommendations. "After consideration of defendants objections thereto (Docket No. 16 ), Report and Recommendation accepted and adopted." (Moore, Kellyann) (Entered: 09/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                OBJECTION to 12 Report and Recommendations filed by MRI Software LLC. (LaMacchia, Brian) (Entered: 09/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Nathaniel M. Gorton: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to Magistrate's Report and Recommendation. (Patch, Christine) (Entered: 09/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objections to Magistrate's Report and Recommendation on Motion to Dismiss by MRI Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(LaMacchia, Brian) (Main Document 14 replaced on 9/17/2012) (Patch, Christine). (Entered: 09/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Dambrosio, Jolyne) (Entered: 09/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ORDER entered. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 8 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss. Recommendation: that the Motion be allowed in part and denied in part. Objections to R&R due by 9/18/2012. (Dambrosio, Jolyne) (Entered: 09/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Opposition re 8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Samia Companies LLC. (Finnegan, Robert) (Entered: 02/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth M. DiPardo on behalf of MRI Software LLC (DiPardo, Elizabeth) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re 8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by MRI Software LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(LaMacchia, Brian) (Attachment 2 replaced on 2/22/2012) (Moore, Kellyann). (Attachment 3 replaced on 2/22/2012) (Moore, Kellyann). (Entered: 02/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss by MRI Software LLC.(LaMacchia, Brian) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF MANUAL FILING by MRI Software LLC re 6 State Court Record (LaMacchia, Brian) (Entered: 01/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATE COURT Record. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(LaMacchia, Brian) (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/25/2012 to redact account numbers) (Moore, Kellyann). (Entered: 01/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Refusal to Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. . (LaMacchia, Brian) (Entered: 01/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to February 20, 2012 to Respond to Complaint by MRI Software LLC.(LaMacchia, Brian) (Entered: 01/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/29/2011, Entered: 12/29/2011 Notice of Case Assignment to a Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Case Assignment. Ch. Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the attached General Order and Notice regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. (Abaid, Kimberly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/29/2011, Entered: 12/29/2011 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by MRI Software LLC identifying Corporate Parent Vista Equity Partners for MRI Software LLC.. (LaMacchia, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 12/29/2011, Entered: 12/29/2011 notice of removal
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MRI Software LLC from Suffolk Superior, case number SUCV2011-04153. ( Filing fee: $ 350, receipt number 0101-3737559 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Civil Category Form)(LaMacchia, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 93 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?