Alvarado et al v. United States of America
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:11-cv-01777
District Judge Peter J. Messitte, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Elizabeth Gallegos-Torres, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Crowell & Moring LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen Mary Clair +1 202 624 2500 +1 202 628 5116 kclair@crowell.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Arash Jahanian +1 202 624 2500 +1 202 628 5116 ajahanian@crowell.com
No Logo Ingrid Munoz, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Crowell & Moring LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen Mary Clair +1 202 624 2500 +1 202 628 5116 kclair@crowell.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Arash Jahanian +1 202 624 2500 +1 202 628 5116 ajahanian@crowell.com
No Logo Natalia Pelaez-Torres, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Crowell & Moring LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen Mary Clair +1 202 624 2500 +1 202 628 5116 kclair@crowell.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Arash Jahanian +1 202 624 2500 +1 202 628 5116 ajahanian@crowell.com
No Logo Pablo Alvarado, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Crowell & Moring LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen Mary Clair +1 202 624 2500 +1 202 628 5116 kclair@crowell.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Arash Jahanian +1 202 624 2500 +1 202 628 5116 ajahanian@crowell.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas H Barnard +1 410 209 4873 +1 410 962 2310 thomas.barnard@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2671
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Rescheduling Settlement Conference for 2/24/2012 at 10:00 a.m. to be held in in the chambers (Room 355A) of Magistrate Judge William Connelly. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Connelly on 12/23/2011. (rss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/23/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
    LETTER/ORDER scheduling a settlement conference for Friday, January 6, 2012 at 10:00 a.m. to be held in the chambers of the Honorable William Connelly. Signed by Magistrate Judge William Connelly on 10/27/2011. (kns, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/28/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge William Connelly for settlement. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 10/11/11. (jmw, Chambers) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
        PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING 11 Consent Motion for Stay and Request for Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 10/6/2011. (jchss, Chambers) (Entered: 10/07/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 11 Filed: 10/5/2011, Entered: None
          Consent MOTION to Stay and Request for Settlement Conference by United States of America Responses due by 10/24/2011 (Barnard, Thomas) (Entered: 10/05/2011)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/24/2011, Entered: None
            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ingrid Munoz, Pablo Alvarado, Elizabeth Gallegos-Torres, Natalia Pelaez-Torres. (Clair, Kathleen) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
              PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING 8 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 8/24/11. (rass, Chambers) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/24/2011, Entered: None
                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time by United States of America Responses due by 9/12/2011 (Barnard, Thomas) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: None
                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ingrid Munoz, Pablo Alvarado, Elizabeth Gallegos-Torres, Natalia Pelaez-Torres. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service of Second Copy of Summons and Complaint to Attorney General)(Clair, Kathleen) (Entered: 07/14/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: None
                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ingrid Munoz, Pablo Alvarado, Elizabeth Gallegos-Torres, Natalia Pelaez-Torres. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service of Second Copy of Summons and Complaint to U.S. Attorney)(Clair, Kathleen) (Entered: 07/14/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: None
                      Summons Issued 60 days as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (kns, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                        Case Assigned to Judge Peter J. Messitte. (rank, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/30/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/29/2011, Entered: None
                          Supplemental to 1 Redacted Document filed by Pablo Alvarado, Elizabeth Gallegos-Torres, Ingrid Munoz, Natalia Pelaez-Torres Summonses. (Attachments: # 1 Summons AG Copy 2, # 2 Summons USAO Copy 1, # 3 Summons USAO Copy 2, # 4 Summons DHS)(Clair, Kathleen) (Entered: 06/29/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/28/2011, Entered: None
                            UNREDACTED DOCUMENT. (Clair, Kathleen) Modified on 7/1/2011 (kns, Deputy Clerk)(Hard Copy rec'd 6/30/11). (Entered: 06/28/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/28/2011, Entered: None
                              REDACTED DOCUMENT Complaint by Pablo Alvarado, Elizabeth Gallegos-Torres, Ingrid Munoz, Natalia Pelaez-Torres. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B)(Clair, Kathleen) Modified security on Exhibit B. on 7/1/2011 (kns, Deputy Clerk)(Hard Copy rec'd 6/30/11). (Entered: 06/28/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 103 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?