Villanueva v. Rice et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 5:07-cv-05721-JW
District Judge James Ware, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Gustavo T Villanueva, Plaintiff
v.
Rice, Condoleezza Rice, Condoleezza, Defendant
Officially listed as "Condoleezza Rice"
Unknown Role, Kior, Inc.
Unknown Role, Evenflow, Inc.
Unknown Role, C3, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Claire T. Cormier +1 408 535 5082 +1 408 535 5081 claire.cormier@usdoj.gov
No Logo Consuelo Pachon, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Claire T. Cormier +1 408 535 5082 +1 408 535 5081 claire.cormier@usdoj.gov
No Logo Kevin Lewis Spriggs, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Claire T. Cormier +1 408 535 5082 +1 408 535 5081 claire.cormier@usdoj.gov
No Logo Maura Harty, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Claire T. Cormier +1 408 535 5082 +1 408 535 5081 claire.cormier@usdoj.gov
Office San Jose
Filed 11/13/2007
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 462 - Naturalization Application
Cause Application for Naturalization
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Stanislaus
Terminated 4/30/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ADRMOP, CLOSED, E-Filing, ProSe
  Entries (50) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 42 Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: 4/30/2008 Stipulation and Order
STIPULATION AND ORDER to Dismiss with Prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41(a) and pursuant to the stipulation of settlement. re [41] Stipulation, filed by Consuelo Pachon, Maura Harty, Condoleezza Rice, Kevin Lewis Spriggs. The Clerk shall close this file. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2008)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: 4/29/2008 Stipulation
    STIPULATION for Dismissal with Prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41(a) and pursuant to the stipulation of settlement. by Condoleezza Rice, Maura Harty, Consuelo Pachon, Kevin Lewis Spriggs. (Cormier, Claire) (Filed on 4/29/2008) Modified on 4/29/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document 40 Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: 4/11/2008 OrderCourt Filing
      STIPULATION AND ORDER re Settlement; Setting Case Management Conference re [39] Stipulation filed by Consuelo Pachon, Maura Harty, Condoleezza Rice, Kevin Lewis Spriggs. Motions terminated: [24] MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Consuelo Pachon, Maura Harty, Condoleezza Rice, Kevin Lewis Spriggs. Joint Status Report or Stipulated Dismissal due by 5/9/2008. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/19/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 4/11/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2008)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: 4/11/2008 Stipulation
        STIPULATION of settlement and proposed order by Condoleezza Rice, Maura Harty, Consuelo Pachon, Kevin Lewis Spriggs. (Cormier, Claire) (Filed on 4/11/2008)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: 3/31/2008 Reply to Opposition
          Reply to Opposition re [24] MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim filed byCondoleezza Rice, Maura Harty, Consuelo Pachon, Kevin Lewis Spriggs. (Cormier, Claire) (Filed on 3/31/2008)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/28/2008, Entered: 4/1/2008 Declaration in Support
            Declaration of Gustavo T. Villanueva of His Voluntary Request to Renounce His Mexican Citizenship filed byGustavo T Villanueva. (srm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2008)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/20/2008, Entered: 3/21/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
              Memorandum in Opposition re [24] MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim filed byGustavo T Villanueva. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2008)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document 35 Filed: 3/13/2008, Entered: 3/13/2008 Order on Motion for ReconsiderationCourt Filing
                ORDER by Judge James Ware denying [33] Motion for Reconsideration;setting aside [31] Entry of Default. (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2008)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 34 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: 2/29/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference from 3/3/2008 to 4/14/2008. Plaintiff's opposition to Defendants' Motion is due by 3/24/2008. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/14/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/27/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2008)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 33 Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: 2/25/2008, Terminated: 3/13/2008 Motion for Reconsideration
                    MOTION for Reconsideration re [29] Order denying [23] motion for default judgment and permanent injunction filed by Gustavo T Villanueva. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2008) (cv, COURT STAFF).
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: 2/25/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                      Memorandum in Opposition and request to reconsider motion for default judgment; and permanent injunction; declaration of Claire T. Cormier filed by Condoleezza Rice, Maura Harty, Consuelo Pachon, Kevin Lewis Spriggs. (Cormier, Claire) (Filed on 2/25/2008) Modified on 2/25/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: 2/21/2008 Clerks Notice of Entry of Default
                        Clerk's Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to defendants Condoleezza Rice, Maura Harty, Consuelo Pachon, Kevin Lewis Spriggs. (Related documents(s) [30]) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2008)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document 30 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008, Terminated: 2/21/2008 Motion for Entry of Default
                          MOTION for Entry of Default as to defendants Dr. C. Rice, M. Harty, C. Pachon, K. L. Spriggs, The U. S. Attorney's Office, Attorney General for the State of California. filed by Gustavo T Villanueva. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2008) (cv, COURT STAFF).
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 29 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: 2/14/2008, Terminated: 2/14/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER by Judge James Ware denying [23] Motion for Default Judgment; denying [23] Motion for Permanent Injunction (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2008) (Entered: 02/14/2008)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 28 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: 2/14/2008 Order on Motion for Default JudgmentCourt Filing
                              **** FILED IN CLERICAL ERROR; PLEASE SEE [29] FOR ORDER **** ORDER by Judge James Ware denying [23] Motion for Default Judgment; denying [23] Motion for Permanent Injunction (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2008) Modified docket text on 2/14/2008 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
                                LREF
                                Blank 27 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: 2/11/2008 Case Management Statement
                                CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Gustavo T Villanueva. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2008)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: 2/11/2008 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b)of discussion of
                                  ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5b) of discussion of ADR options and notice of need for ADR phone conference (Cormier, Claire) (Filed on 2/11/2008)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: 2/11/2008 Case Management Statement
                                    CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Condoleezza Rice, Maura Harty, Consuelo Pachon, Kevin Lewis Spriggs. (Cormier, Claire) (Filed on 2/11/2008)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: 2/11/2008, Terminated: 4/11/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                      MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Condoleezza Rice, Maura Harty, Consuelo Pachon, Kevin Lewis Spriggs. Motion Hearing set for 4/14/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Cormier, Claire) (Filed on 2/11/2008) Modified on 2/11/2008 (cv, COURT STAFF).
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank 23 Filed: 1/28/2008, Entered: 2/7/2008, Terminated: 2/14/2008 Motion for Default Judgment
                                        MOTION for Default Judgment as to each named defendant, MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by Gustavo T Villanueva. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2008)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 22 Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: 1/16/2008 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                                          ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge James Ware for all further proceedings and Magistrate Judge Patricia V. Trumbull for all discovery matters. Signed by The Executive Committee on 01/16/07. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2008)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 21 Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: 1/16/2008 Clerks Notice
                                            CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT. Case Management Statement due by 2/11/2008. Case Management Conference set for 3/3/2008 10:00 AM Before Honorable James Ware. (cm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2008)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 20 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: 1/15/2008 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate JuCourt Filing
                                              Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Condoleezza Rice. (Cormier, Claire) (Filed on 1/15/2008)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 19 Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: 1/8/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER Denying Request For Reconsideration of Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull on 1/7/08. (pvtlc3) (Filed on 1/8/2008)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 18 Filed: 1/2/2008, Entered: 1/2/2008 Request
                                                  REQUEST for Counsel on a Pro Bono Basis by Gustavo T Villanueva. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2008)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 17 Filed: 1/2/2008, Entered: 1/2/2008 Certificate Of Service.
                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gustavo T Villanueva re [3] ADR Scheduling Order, [1] Petition (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2008)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 16 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: 12/13/2007 Certificate Of Service.
                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY United States Mail to United States Attorney's Office, San Jose, CA re [3] ADR Scheduling Order, ([2]) Request for Appointment of Counsel, ([1]) Petition by Gustavo T Villanueva (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2007)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: 12/11/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to USA
                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gustavo T Villanueva. Maura Harty served on 11/26/2007, answer due 1/25/2008. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2007)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 14 Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: 12/11/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to USA
                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gustavo T Villanueva. Lewis Spriggs served on 11/23/2007, answer due 1/22/2008. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2007)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: 12/11/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to USA
                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gustavo T Villanueva. Condoleezza Rice served on 11/26/2007, answer due 1/25/2008. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2007)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 12 Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: 12/11/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to USA
                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gustavo T Villanueva. Consuelo Pachon served on 11/13/2007, answer due 1/12/2008. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2007)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 11 Filed: 12/7/2007, Entered: 12/7/2007 Order on Motion to Appoint CounselCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER by Judge Patricia V. Trumbull denying [2] Motion to Appoint Counsel (pvtlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2007)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 10 Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                  CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Gustavo T Villanueva.. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2007)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 9 Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 Jury Demand
                                                                    DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Gustavo T Villanueva. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2007)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 Amended Complaint
                                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment Establish U.S. CITIZENSHIP against all defendants. Filed by Gustavo T Villanueva. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2007)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 Summons Issued as to USA
                                                                        Summons Issued as to Maura Harty, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2007)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 Summons Issued as to USA
                                                                          Summons Issued as to Lewis Spriggs, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2007)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 Summons Issued as to USA
                                                                            Summons Issued as to Condoleezza Rice, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2007)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 Summons Issued as to USA
                                                                              Summons Issued as to Consuelo Pachon, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2007)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to USA
                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gustavo T Villanueva. Condoleezza Rice served on 11/13/2007, answer due 1/12/2008. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2007)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to USA
                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gustavo T Villanueva. Lewis Spriggs served on 11/13/2007, answer due 1/12/2008. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2007)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to USA
                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gustavo T Villanueva. Maura Harty served on 11/13/2007, answer due 1/12/2008. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2007)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gustavo T Villanueva. Consuelo Pachon served on 11/13/2007, answer due 1/12/2008. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2007) Modified on 11/20/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/14/2007 ADR Scheduling Order
                                                                                        ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 2/26/2008. Case Management Conference set for 3/4/2008 02:00 PM. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2007)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 2 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/14/2007, Terminated: 12/7/2007 Motion to Appoint Counsel
                                                                                          Request for Appointment of Counsel; Declaration in Support of Request filed by Gustavo T Villanueva. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/14/2007 (bw, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/14/2007 Petition
                                                                                            PETITION for Declaratory Judgment to Establish Untied States Citizenship (Summons Issued) against all defendants (Filing fee $350 receipt number 54611002058). Filed by Gustavo T Villanueva. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2007)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/14/2007 Summons Issued as to USA
                                                                                              Summons Issued as to Maura Harty, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2007)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/14/2007 Summons Issued as to USA
                                                                                                Summons Issued as to Lewis Spriggs, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2007)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/14/2007 Summons Issued as to USA
                                                                                                  Summons Issued as to Condoleezza Rice, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2007)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/14/2007 Summons Issued as to USA
                                                                                                    Summons Issued as to Consuelo Pachon, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2007)
                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 354 times.

                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                       
                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                      Need Password Help?