Dutton v. Healthcare Memorandum, #
Federal Court Proceeding Michigan Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:08-md-01952
District Judge Paul D Borman, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 29, 2020 at 9:21 AM DT (11.8 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo 3PO Gas, Incorporated, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lee T Patajo - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 858 485 6535 +1 858 485 0608

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Lee T Patajo - MDL NOT ADMITTED

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander Michael Schack +1 858 485 6535 +1 858 485 0608 amslawoffice@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Mogin Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chad M McManamy - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 619 687 6611 +1 619 687 6610 chad@moginlaw.com
No Logo 6th & Island Investments, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Umeda LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian James Robbins +1 619 525 3990 +1 619 525 3991 brobbins@robbinsumeda.com

Represented by Weinner, Gould,

No Logo 823 Sproul Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by The Miller Law Firm, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martha J. Olijnyk +1 248 841 2200 mjo@millerlawpc.com
No Logo Ainello Mancusi, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wild Law Group PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew S. Wild +1 914 514 3200 +1 914 514 3201 mwild@wildlawgroup.com
No Logo Alvin's Enterprises, Incorporated, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael S. Cafferty +1 313 964 3070 mcaffe@aol.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Edward Cafferty +1 312 782 4880 +1 734 769 1207

Toggle Switch Represented by Gurewitz & Raben, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Harold Z. Gurewitz +1 313 628 4740 +1 313 628 4701 hgurewitz@grplc.com

Represented by Kohn Swift & Graf PC

Toggle Switch Represented by SACHS WALDMAN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary Ellen Gurewitz +1 313 965 3464 +1 313 965 0268 megurewitz@sachswaldman.com
No Logo Americana Food Store, Incorporated, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Clark Hill, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul F. Novak +1 517 318 3100 +1 517 318 3099 pnovak@clarkhill.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kaplan and Kilsheimer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert N. Kaplan , +1 212 687 1980 +1 212 687 7714 rkaplan@kaplanfox.com

Represented by Lockridge Grindal Nauen, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter George Safirstein +1 212 271 8205 +1 212 868 1229 psafirstein@milbergweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ross, Dixon & Masback

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason Hartley +1 619 557 4315

Toggle Switch Represented by Sutts Strosberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/24/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew J. Morganti +1 519 561 6251 andrew@strosbergco.com
No Logo Arkansas Garden Center North, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Elwood S. Simon & Associates, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elwood S. Simon +1 248 646 9730 +1 248 258 2335 esimon@esimon-law.com

Represented by Kohn Swift & Graf PC

No Logo Arkansas Garden Center West, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Elwood S. Simon & Associates, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elwood S. Simon +1 248 646 9730 +1 248 258 2335 esimon@esimon-law.com

Represented by Kohn Swift & Graf PC

No Logo Baron Group, Incorporated, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/30/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aaron Patton - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 212 680 5150 +1 646 277 1151 aarondpatton@gmail.com

Represented by Chestnut & Cambronne

Toggle Switch Represented by Elwood S. Simon & Associates, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elwood S. Simon +1 248 646 9730 +1 248 258 2335 esimon@esimon-law.com
No Logo Bedros, Incorporated, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lance C. Young +1 734 446 6932 younglcy@hotmail.com
No Logo Blue Ash Service Center, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Edward Cafferty +1 312 782 4880 +1 734 769 1207

Toggle Switch Represented by Cafferty Faucher LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan Lee Clobes +1 215 864 2800 +1 215 864 2810 bclobes@millerfaucher.com
No Logo Boone's Opportunity, Incorporated, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Elwood S. Simon & Associates, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elwood S. Simon +1 248 646 9730 +1 248 258 2335 esimon@esimon-law.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JOHN P. ZUCCARINI +1 248 646 9730 +1 248 258 2335 zuccarinis@aol.com
No Logo Brian W Buttars, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M. Perrin +1 586 773 9500 +1 586 773 3475 johnmperrin@sbcglobal.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Wild Law Group PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew S. Wild +1 914 514 3200 +1 914 514 3201 mwild@wildlawgroup.com
No Logo Bryan S Neal, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by The Shea Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shawn-Lee M. Goddard +1 248 354 0224 +1 248 354 0440 shawn.goddard@theshealawfirm.com
No Logo Bynarry Ltd., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Boies, Schiller & Flexner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Philip J. Iovieno +1 518 434 0600 +1 518 434 0665 piovieno@bsfllp.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kimberly Horton Schultz +1 603 643 9090 +1 603 643 9010 kschultz@bsfllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nutter, McClennen & Fish, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward A. Baker +1 617 439 2291 +1 617 310 9291 ebaker@nutter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Miller Law Firm, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martha J. Olijnyk +1 248 841 2200 mjo@millerlawpc.com
No Logo Champs Liquors, Incorporated, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Federal Reserve Building

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Robert Jacobs +1 513 621 2120 wrjacobs@strausstroy.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Strauss Troy Company, LPA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas P. Glass +1 513 621 2120 +1 513 629 9426 tpglass@strausstroy.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Wayne, S. +1 513 621 2120 +6299 629 629 9426 rswayne@strausstroy.com
No Logo Charlie Holland Motors, Incorporated, Plaintiff

Represented by Spector Roseman Kodroff & Willis, PC

Toggle Switch Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry Barnett - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 214 754 1900
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Charest - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 214 754 1900 +1 214 754 1933 dcharest@susmangodfrey.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terrell Oxford - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 214 754 1900

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity AS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Wood - MDL NOT ADMITTED
No Logo Chi-Mar Enterprises, Incorporated, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David H. Fink +1 810 851 4111

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Linda Phyllis Nussbaum +1 212 838 7797 +1 212 848 7745

Toggle Switch Represented by Kaplan and Kilsheimer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert N. Kaplan , +1 212 687 1980 +1 212 687 7714 rkaplan@kaplanfox.com

Represented by Kohn Swift & Graf PC

Toggle Switch Represented by McDonald, Hopkins, Burke & Haber Company, LPA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/11/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John D Fabian - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 216 348 5400
TERMINATED: 02/11/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edmund W. Searby +1 216 348 5400 +1 216 348 5474 esearby@mcdonaldhopkins.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Miller Law Firm, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED E. Powell Miller +1 248 841 2200 +1 248 652 2852 epm@millerlawpc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martha J. Olijnyk +1 248 841 2200 mjo@millerlawpc.com
No Logo Chukrid Khorchid, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gustafson Gluek PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James W Anderson - MDL NOT ADMITTED
No Logo Circle Beer & Beverage, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by The Miller Law Firm, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martha J. Olijnyk +1 248 841 2200 mjo@millerlawpc.com
No Logo Cobblestone Tequesta, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David William Mitchell +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 DavidM@rgrdlaw.com

Represented by Weinner, Gould,

No Logo Dennis, Patrick, Plaintiff
Unknown Role, QUANTUM CORP /DE/

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Donald C Amamgbo - MDL NOT ADMITTED

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donald C Amamgbo - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 510 615 6000
No Logo Donald K Tomino, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by The Miller Law Firm, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martha J. Olijnyk +1 248 841 2200 mjo@millerlawpc.com
No Logo Elite Energy, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldman Scarlato and Karon, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED STEVEN A. ASHER +1 484 342 0700

Represented by Miller Canfield Paddock & Stone, PLC

Toggle Switch Represented by SACHS WALDMAN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary Ellen Gurewitz +1 313 965 3464 +1 313 965 0268 megurewitz@sachswaldman.com
No Logo Ethamma Emmanuel, Plaintiff

Represented by Spector Roseman Kodroff & Willis, PC

Toggle Switch Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry Barnett - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 214 754 1900
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Charest - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 214 754 1900 +1 214 754 1933 dcharest@susmangodfrey.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terrell Oxford - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 214 754 1900
No Logo F & V Oil Company, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jacob A. Goldberg +1 215 782 8235 +1 215 782 8236 jacobagoldberg@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Stephen F. Wasinger PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen F. Wasinger +1 248 544 1500 +1 248 544 1501 sfw@sfwlaw.com
No Logo Farm Stores Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Berman DeValerio, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel A. Bushell +1 561 835 9400 +1 561 835 0322 dbushell@bermandevalerio.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter A. Pease +1 617 542 8300 +1 617 542 1194 ppease@bermanesq.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Elwood S. Simon & Associates, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elwood S. Simon +1 248 646 9730 +1 248 258 2335 esimon@esimon-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICES OF TERRY L. GODDARD JR. PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph J. Tabacco, Jr. +1 617 542 8300

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan Meyers

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey T. Meyers +1 313 961 0130 pderrick@morganmeyers.com
No Logo Five Angels Management, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of David McLafferty - MDL NOT ADMITTED

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David McLafferty - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 610 940 4000

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Stewart Weltman - MDL NOT ADMITTED

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stewart Weltman - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 312 606 8756

Toggle Switch Represented by Levin, Fishbein, Sedran & Berman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Austin Cohen - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 215 592 1500
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Sweedler - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 215 592 1500

Toggle Switch Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry Barnett - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 214 754 1900
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terrell Oxford - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 214 754 1900
No Logo Fu-Wah Mini Market, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Berger & Montague PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED H. Laddie Montague, Jr. +1 215 875 3000 +1 215 875 4604 hlmontague@bm.net

Represented by Hoffman & Edelson

Toggle Switch Represented by McDonald, Hopkins, Burke & Haber Company, LPA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/11/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John D Fabian - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 216 348 5400
No Logo Gaslamp Country Club, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Umeda LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Paul Fink +1 619 525 3990 +1 619 525 3991 notice@robbinsumeda.com

Represented by Weinner, Gould,

No Logo GM Food and Fuel, LLC, Plaintiff

Represented by Chestnut & Cambronne

Toggle Switch Represented by Elwood S. Simon & Associates, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elwood S. Simon +1 248 646 9730 +1 248 258 2335 esimon@esimon-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Reinhardt Wendorf & Blanchfield

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Reinhardt - NOT ADMITTED +1 651 278 2100

Toggle Switch Represented by Richard L Jasperson, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard L Jasperson - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 651 223 5039
No Logo Hamid Amini, Plaintiff
No Logo Higginbotham Oil Company, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Edward Cafferty +1 312 782 4880 +1 734 769 1207

Toggle Switch Represented by Cafferty Faucher LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan Lee Clobes +1 215 864 2800 +1 215 864 2810 bclobes@millerfaucher.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn, Connor, Weaver, Davies & Rouco, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Paul Rouco +1 205 803 4143 +1 205 328 9669 rrouco@qcwdr.com
No Logo House of Faith, Incorporated, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Elwood S. Simon & Associates, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elwood S. Simon +1 248 646 9730 +1 248 258 2335 esimon@esimon-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Straus & Boies LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nathan M. Cihlar - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 703 764 8700 +1 703 764 8704 ncihlar@straus-boies.com
No Logo JA-WY, Inc, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Elwood S. Simon & Associates, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elwood S. Simon +1 248 646 9730 +1 248 258 2335 esimon@esimon-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Charles H. Johnson - NOT ADMITTED

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles H. Johnson - NOT ADMITTED +1 641 633 5685

Toggle Switch Represented by Reinhardt Wendorf & Blanchfield

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Reinhardt - NOT ADMITTED +1 651 278 2100
No Logo James Feeney, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wild Law Group PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew S. Wild +1 914 514 3200 +1 914 514 3201 mwild@wildlawgroup.com
No Logo James, Taylor, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Evan Spencer Attorney At Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Larry Daniel Drury +1 312 346 7950 +1 312 346 5777 ldrurylaw@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gingras, Cates,

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John L Cates +1 608 833 2632 +1 608 833 2874 cates@gcllawyers.com
No Logo Jan Barranco-Grams, Plaintiff
No Logo JBZ, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Clark Hill, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul F. Novak +1 517 318 3100 +1 517 318 3099 pnovak@clarkhill.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Loeb, Thomas M.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan A. Husaynu +1 248 356 7979 +1 248 356 7799 hplaw@mich.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Petrella Brown

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/14/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marisa C. Petrella +1 248 223 9883 mail@petrellabrown.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sutts Strosberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/24/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew J. Morganti +1 519 561 6251 andrew@strosbergco.com
No Logo Jeff Manry, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Burgess & Lamb, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ralph K. Phalen +1 816 589 0753 +1 816 471 1701 phalenlaw@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Joseph Zebas - MDL NOT ADMITTED

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Zebas - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 505 393 1024
No Logo Jenifer Valencia, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Burgess & Lamb, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mitchell L. Burgess +1 816 471 1700 +1 816 471 1701 mitch@burgessandlamb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ralph K. Phalen +1 816 589 0753 +1 816 471 1701 phalenlaw@comcast.net
No Logo Jennin Gil, Plaintiff
No Logo John Chamberlain, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by VanOverbeke Michaud & Timmony, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas C. Michaud +1 313 578 1200 +1 313 578 1201 tmichaud@vmtlaw.com
No Logo Joseph Difabritiis 7-11 Food Store 24428, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Fine Kaplan & Black, RPC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ria C. Momblanco - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 215 567 6565 +1 215 568 5872 rmomblanco@finekaplan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fine, Kaplan,

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED GERARD A. DEVER +1 215 567 6565 +1 215 568 5872 gdever@finekaplan.com

Represented by Miller Canfield Paddock & Stone, PLC

No Logo Joseph Krainc, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by The Miller Law Firm, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martha J. Olijnyk +1 248 841 2200 mjo@millerlawpc.com
No Logo Joseph Massino, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Googasian Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dean M. Googasian +1 248 540 3333 dgoogasian@googasian.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas H. Howlett +1 248 540 3333 +1 248 540 7213 thowlett@googasian.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Heins Mills & Olson, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katherine Kelly - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 612 338 4605

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Ann White - MDL NOT ADMITTED

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ann White - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 215 481 0274

Toggle Switch Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry Barnett - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 214 754 1900
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Charest - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 214 754 1900 +1 214 754 1933 dcharest@susmangodfrey.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terrell Oxford - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 214 754 1900
No Logo Juniata Mobil, Plaintiff

Represented by Faruqi & Faruqi, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by McDonald, Hopkins, Burke & Haber Company, LPA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/11/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John D Fabian - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 216 348 5400
TERMINATED: 02/11/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edmund W. Searby +1 216 348 5400 +1 216 348 5474 esearby@mcdonaldhopkins.com
No Logo Karen Davis, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Donald C Amamgbo - MDL NOT ADMITTED

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donald C Amamgbo - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 510 615 6000
No Logo Karen's Pantry, Incorporated, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Elwood S. Simon & Associates, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elwood S. Simon +1 248 646 9730 +1 248 258 2335 esimon@esimon-law.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JOHN P. ZUCCARINI +1 248 646 9730 +1 248 258 2335 zuccarinis@aol.com
No Logo Kenco, Incorporated, Plaintiff

Represented by Kohn Swift & Graf PC

Toggle Switch Represented by LaFlamme & Mauldin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard N. LaFlamme +1 517 784 9122 rlaflamme@lm-law.net
No Logo Kingsway Enterprises, Incorporated, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Elwood S. Simon & Associates, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elwood S. Simon +1 248 646 9730 +1 248 258 2335 esimon@esimon-law.com

Represented by Kohn Swift & Graf PC

Toggle Switch Represented by Straus & Boies LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nathan M. Cihlar - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 703 764 8700 +1 703 764 8704 ncihlar@straus-boies.com
No Logo Kopilenko International Wines & Liquors, Incorporated, Plaintiff

Represented by Lockridge Grindal Nauen, LLP

Represented by Miller Canfield Paddock & Stone, PLC

No Logo Kozak Enterprises, Incorporated, Plaintiff

Represented by Lockridge Grindal Nauen, LLP

Represented by Miller Canfield Paddock & Stone, PLC

No Logo Lanesville Food Mart, Incorporated, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen & Malad, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Irwin B. Levin +1 317 636 6481 +1 317 636 2593 ilevin@cohenandmalad.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry Barnett - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 214 754 1900
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Charest - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 214 754 1900 +1 214 754 1933 dcharest@susmangodfrey.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terrell Oxford - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 214 754 1900
No Logo Lansdale Oil Company, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jacob A. Goldberg +1 215 782 8235 +1 215 782 8236 jacobagoldberg@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Stephen F. Wasinger PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen F. Wasinger +1 248 544 1500 +1 248 544 1501 sfw@sfwlaw.com
No Logo Lawrence J Acker, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M. Perrin +1 586 773 9500 +1 586 773 3475 johnmperrin@sbcglobal.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Wild Law Group PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew S. Wild +1 914 514 3200 +1 914 514 3201 mwild@wildlawgroup.com
No Logo Linco Distributing Company, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Locks Law Firm, LLC

Toggle Switch Represented by The Miller Law Firm, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martha J. Olijnyk +1 248 841 2200 mjo@millerlawpc.com
No Logo Linda Desmond, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M. Perrin +1 586 773 9500 +1 586 773 3475 johnmperrin@sbcglobal.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Wild Law Group PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew S. Wild +1 914 514 3200 +1 914 514 3201 mwild@wildlawgroup.com
No Logo Lori Muse, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kickham Hanley PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy O. McMahon +1 248 544 1500 +1 248 544 1501 tmcmahon@kickhamhanley.com
No Logo Mall Mart, Incorporated, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Elwood S. Simon & Associates, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elwood S. Simon +1 248 646 9730 +1 248 258 2335 esimon@esimon-law.com

Represented by Lockridge Grindal Nauen, LLP

No Logo Marcellino E Bryant, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Barrett Law Office, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Don* Barrett +1 601 834 2376 +1 662 834 2628

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Charles P Yezbak - MDL NOT ADMITTED

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles P. Yezbak, III +1 615 250 2000 +1 615 250 2020 yezbak@yezbaklaw.com
No Logo Marchbanks Travel Service, Incorporated, Plaintiff

Represented by Berger & Montague PA

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Joshua P. Davis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua P. Davis +1 415 422 6223 davisj@usfca.edu

Represented by Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by McDonald, Hopkins, Burke & Haber Company, LPA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/11/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John D Fabian - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 216 348 5400

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1111

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Alan Balto +1 202 577 5424 dbalto@yahoo.com
No Logo Marin Scotty's Market, Incorporated, Plaintiff
No Logo Market Street Investment, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Umeda LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian James Robbins +1 619 525 3990 +1 619 525 3991 brobbins@robbinsumeda.com

Represented by Weinner, Gould,

No Logo Martin G McNulty, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew A. Paterson, Jr. +1 248 291 0500 +1 248 291 0505 aap43@hotmail.com
No Logo Mazel LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ronald Judah Aranoff +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 aranoff@bernlieb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MEL E. LIFSHITZ +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218

Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by The Miller Law Firm, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martha J. Olijnyk +1 248 841 2200 mjo@millerlawpc.com
No Logo Meleen Corporation, Plaintiff

Represented by Chestnut & Cambronne

Toggle Switch Represented by Elwood S. Simon & Associates, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elwood S. Simon +1 248 646 9730 +1 248 258 2335 esimon@esimon-law.com
No Logo Melrick, Incorporated, Plaintiff

Represented by Jackier, Gould,

No Logo Michael G Coffey, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Zausmer, Kaufman, August, Caldwell & Tayler, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/30/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mischa Boardman +1 248 851 4111 mboardman@zkact.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark J. Zausmer +1 248 851 4111 mzausmer@zkac.com
No Logo Mount Pocono Campground, Inc, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Martin E Grossman - MDL NOT ADMITTED

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin E Grossman - MDL NOT ADMITTED

Toggle Switch Represented by Meredith & Cohen

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven J Greenfogel - MDL NOT ADMITTED

Toggle Switch Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry Barnett - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 214 754 1900
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Charest - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 214 754 1900 +1 214 754 1933 dcharest@susmangodfrey.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terrell Oxford - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 214 754 1900
No Logo Nirgundas, Incorporated, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Freed, Kanner,

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William H. London +1 224 632 4500 +1 224 632 4521 wlondon@fklmlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry Barnett - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 214 754 1900
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Charest - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 214 754 1900 +1 214 754 1933 dcharest@susmangodfrey.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terrell Oxford - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 214 754 1900
No Logo Patrick Reeners, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Barrett Law Office, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Don* Barrett +1 601 834 2376 +1 662 834 2628

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Charles P Yezbak - MDL NOT ADMITTED

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles P. Yezbak, III +1 615 250 2000 +1 615 250 2020 yezbak@yezbaklaw.com
No Logo Patrick Simasko, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M. Perrin +1 586 773 9500 +1 586 773 3475 johnmperrin@sbcglobal.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Wild Law Group PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew S. Wild +1 914 514 3200 +1 914 514 3201 mwild@wildlawgroup.com
No Logo Perry Peka, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M. Perrin +1 586 773 9500 +1 586 773 3475 johnmperrin@sbcglobal.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Wild Law Group PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew S. Wild +1 914 514 3200 +1 914 514 3201 mwild@wildlawgroup.com
No Logo Petro's Beverage Co., Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Boies, Schiller & Flexner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Philip J. Iovieno +1 518 434 0600 +1 518 434 0665 piovieno@bsfllp.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kimberly Horton Schultz +1 603 643 9090 +1 603 643 9010 kschultz@bsfllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nutter, McClennen & Fish, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward A. Baker +1 617 439 2291 +1 617 310 9291 ebaker@nutter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Miller Law Firm, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martha J. Olijnyk +1 248 841 2200 mjo@millerlawpc.com
No Logo Polly's Food Service, Incorporated, Plaintiff

Represented by Kohn Swift & Graf PC

Toggle Switch Represented by LaFlamme & Mauldin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard N. LaFlamme +1 517 784 9122 rlaflamme@lm-law.net
No Logo Public Foods, Incorporated, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Clark Hill, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul F. Novak +1 517 318 3100 +1 517 318 3099 pnovak@clarkhill.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kaplan and Kilsheimer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert N. Kaplan , +1 212 687 1980 +1 212 687 7714 rkaplan@kaplanfox.com

Represented by Lockridge Grindal Nauen, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter George Safirstein +1 212 271 8205 +1 212 868 1229 psafirstein@milbergweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ross, Dixon & Masback

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason Hartley +1 619 557 4315

Toggle Switch Represented by Sutts Strosberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/24/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew J. Morganti +1 519 561 6251 andrew@strosbergco.com
No Logo Radha, Incorporated, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Freed, Kanner,

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William H. London +1 224 632 4500 +1 224 632 4521 wlondon@fklmlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry Barnett - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 214 754 1900
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Charest - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 214 754 1900 +1 214 754 1933 dcharest@susmangodfrey.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terrell Oxford - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 214 754 1900
No Logo Rick Drontle, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Googasian Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dean M. Googasian +1 248 540 3333 dgoogasian@googasian.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas H. Howlett +1 248 540 3333 +1 248 540 7213 thowlett@googasian.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Heins Mills & Olson, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katherine Kelly - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 612 338 4605
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel Heins - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 612 338 4605

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Nathaniel Hobbs - MDL NOT ADMITTED

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nathaniel Hobbs - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 952 564 6262

Toggle Switch Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry Barnett - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 214 754 1900
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Charest - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 214 754 1900 +1 214 754 1933 dcharest@susmangodfrey.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terrell Oxford - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 214 754 1900
No Logo Rickey Ryberg, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by The Miller Law Firm, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martha J. Olijnyk +1 248 841 2200 mjo@millerlawpc.com
No Logo Ridge Plaza, Incorporated, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Ademi & O'Reilly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J. Syrios +1 414 482 8000 +1 414 482 8001 dsyrios@ademilaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Elwood S. Simon & Associates, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elwood S. Simon +1 248 646 9730 +1 248 258 2335 esimon@esimon-law.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JOHN P. ZUCCARINI +1 248 646 9730 +1 248 258 2335 zuccarinis@aol.com

Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of David J. Syrios

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Guri Ademi +1 414 482 8000 +1 414 482 8001 gademi@ademilaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shpetim Ademi +1 414 482 8000 sademi@ademilaw.com
No Logo Roberta Wooten, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by The Miller Law Firm, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martha J. Olijnyk +1 248 841 2200 mjo@millerlawpc.com
No Logo Rodney Blasingame, Plaintiff

Represented by Girard Gibbs, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Smyser Kaplan & Veselka LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Larry Veselka - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 713 221 2325
No Logo Ron Miastkowski, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M. Perrin +1 586 773 9500 +1 586 773 3475 johnmperrin@sbcglobal.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Wild Law Group PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew S. Wild +1 914 514 3200 +1 914 514 3201 mwild@wildlawgroup.com
No Logo RSB Wellman Co., Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Edward Cafferty +1 312 782 4880 +1 734 769 1207

Toggle Switch Represented by Cafferty Faucher LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan Lee Clobes +1 215 864 2800 +1 215 864 2810 bclobes@millerfaucher.com
No Logo S and S Lima, Incorporated, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Edward Cafferty +1 312 782 4880 +1 734 769 1207

Toggle Switch Represented by Cafferty Faucher LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan Lee Clobes +1 215 864 2800 +1 215 864 2810 bclobes@millerfaucher.com
No Logo Shree Narayandas, Incorporated, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Freed, Kanner,

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William H. London +1 224 632 4500 +1 224 632 4521 wlondon@fklmlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry Barnett - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 214 754 1900
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Charest - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 214 754 1900 +1 214 754 1933 dcharest@susmangodfrey.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terrell Oxford - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 214 754 1900
No Logo Silver Springs Liquor Incorporated, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by CHARFOOS & CHRISTENSEN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ann K. Mandt +1 313 875 8080 +1 313 875 9857 akmandt@c2law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Elwood S. Simon & Associates, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elwood S. Simon +1 248 646 9730 +1 248 258 2335 esimon@esimon-law.com
No Logo Solid Waste, Limited, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Elwood S. Simon & Associates, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elwood S. Simon +1 248 646 9730 +1 248 258 2335 esimon@esimon-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schwartz, Junell, Greenberg & Oathout, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roger B Greenberg - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 713 276 3456
No Logo Springfield Exxon, LLC, Plaintiff

Represented by Miller Canfield Paddock & Stone, PLC

Toggle Switch Represented by SACHS WALDMAN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary Ellen Gurewitz +1 313 965 3464 +1 313 965 0268 megurewitz@sachswaldman.com
No Logo Suzie's Investments, Inc. d/b/a Checker Drugs and Food, Plaintiff

Represented by Kohn Swift & Graf PC

No Logo Tahira Firdous, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Murray Frank & Sailer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Phillip Murray +1 212 682 1818 +1 212 682 1892 bmurray@murrayfrank.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Reinhardt Wendorf & Blanchfield

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Reinhardt - NOT ADMITTED +1 651 278 2100
No Logo Thomas Beverage Company, Incorporated, Plaintiff

Represented by Gergosian & Gralewski LLP

Represented by Kohn Swift & Graf PC

Represented by Lockridge Grindal Nauen, LLP

Represented by Miller Canfield Paddock & Stone, PLC

Represented by Trujillo Rodriguez & Richards LLC

No Logo Thomas F Prazan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Burgess & Lamb, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ralph K. Phalen +1 816 589 0753 +1 816 471 1701 phalenlaw@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by SCHICKER LAW FIRM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard J. Schicker +1 402 344 4400 +1 402 344 2581 rschicker@teamschick.com
No Logo Thrifty Liquor, Incorporated, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Elwood S. Simon & Associates, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elwood S. Simon +1 248 646 9730 +1 248 258 2335 esimon@esimon-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kelli Lerner - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 212 907 0700
No Logo Tommy Williams, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Burgess & Lamb, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ralph K. Phalen +1 816 589 0753 +1 816 471 1701 phalenlaw@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Gene M Cullan - MDL NOT ADMITTED

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gene M Cullan - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 602 200 8700
No Logo Twin Value, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Clark Hill, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul F. Novak +1 517 318 3100 +1 517 318 3099 pnovak@clarkhill.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kaplan and Kilsheimer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert N. Kaplan , +1 212 687 1980 +1 212 687 7714 rkaplan@kaplanfox.com

Represented by Lockridge Grindal Nauen, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter George Safirstein +1 212 271 8205 +1 212 868 1229 psafirstein@milbergweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ross, Dixon & Masback

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason Hartley +1 619 557 4315

Toggle Switch Represented by Sutts Strosberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/24/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew J. Morganti +1 519 561 6251 andrew@strosbergco.com
No Logo Universal Hillcrest, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Umeda LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Paul Fink +1 619 525 3990 +1 619 525 3991 notice@robbinsumeda.com

Represented by Weinner, Gould,

No Logo VB & FS Oil Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jacob A. Goldberg +1 215 782 8235 +1 215 782 8236 jacobagoldberg@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Stephen F. Wasinger PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen F. Wasinger +1 248 544 1500 +1 248 544 1501 sfw@sfwlaw.com
No Logo Warrington Fuels, Incorporated, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kaplan and Kilsheimer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert N. Kaplan , +1 212 687 1980 +1 212 687 7714 rkaplan@kaplanfox.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McDonald, Hopkins, Burke & Haber Company, LPA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/11/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John D Fabian - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 216 348 5400
TERMINATED: 02/11/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edmund W. Searby +1 216 348 5400 +1 216 348 5474 esearby@mcdonaldhopkins.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Miller Law Firm, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED E. Powell Miller +1 248 841 2200 +1 248 652 2852 epm@millerlawpc.com
No Logo Wayne Stanford, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M. Perrin +1 586 773 9500 +1 586 773 3475 johnmperrin@sbcglobal.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Wild Law Group PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew S. Wild +1 914 514 3200 +1 914 514 3201 mwild@wildlawgroup.com
No Logo Wayne Sydor, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Evan Spencer Attorney At Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Larry Daniel Drury +1 312 346 7950 +1 312 346 5777 ldrurylaw@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gingras, Cates,

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John L Cates +1 608 833 2632 +1 608 833 2874 cates@gcllawyers.com
No Logo Wilson Farms, Incorporated, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Blecher and Collins PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Maxwell Blecher - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 213 622 4222

Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Represented by Case Lombardi & Pettit

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/07/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jon King - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 415 229 2080
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael D. Hausfeld +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 mhausfeld@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cuneo, Gilbert,

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Cuneo - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 202 789 3960

Toggle Switch Represented by Hausfeld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Lebsock - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 415 633 1949 +1 415 358 4980 clebsock@hausfeldllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Arthur N. Bailey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Arthur Bailey - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 716 664 2967

Represented by Steyer Lowenthal Boodrookas Alvarez & Smith LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry Barnett - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 214 754 1900
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Charest - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 214 754 1900 +1 214 754 1933 dcharest@susmangodfrey.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terrell Oxford - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 214 754 1900
No Logo Y & R's, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Edward Cafferty +1 312 782 4880 +1 734 769 1207
TERMINATED: 08/27/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY Daniel Blair Scott +5823 582 582 3143 +1 610 649 3633

Toggle Switch Represented by Cafferty Faucher LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan Lee Clobes +1 215 864 2800 +1 215 864 2810 bclobes@millerfaucher.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Chimicles & Tikellis, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Alan Schwartz +1 610 642 8500 +1 610 649 3633 stevenschartz@chimicles.com
v.
No Logo Arctic Glacier Income Fund, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lisa A. Brown
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Howard B. Iwrey +1 313 465 7000

Toggle Switch Represented by Butzel Long, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/08/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY Daniel N. Sharkey +1 313 225 7000

Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

No Logo Arctic Glacier International Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Arctic Glacier International, Incorporated"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lisa A. Brown
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Howard B. Iwrey +1 313 465 7000

Toggle Switch Represented by Butzel Long, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/08/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY Daniel N. Sharkey +1 313 225 7000

Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

No Logo Arctic Glacier Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Arctic Glacier, Incorporated"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lisa A. Brown
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Howard B. Iwrey +1 313 465 7000

Toggle Switch Represented by Butzel Long, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/08/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY Daniel N. Sharkey +1 313 225 7000

Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

No Logo Arctic Glaicer California, Incorporated, Defendant
No Logo Home City Ice Company,, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sanford M. Litvack +1 212 259 8000

Toggle Switch Represented by **ECF

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth W. Hartman +1 402 636 8341 +1 402 344 0588 khartman@bairdholm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fredrikson & Byron, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/05/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rachna B Sullivan +1 612 492 7345 +1 612 492 7077 rsullivan@fredlaw.com
TERMINATED: 12/05/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Todd A. Wind +1 612 347 7061 +1 612 492 7077 twind@fredlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Graydon Head & Ritchey, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J. Jeffrey Landen +1 859 578 2420 +1 859 525 0214 jlanden@graydon.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John B. Pinney +1 513 621 6464 +1 513 651 3836 jpinney@graydon.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael A Roberts +1 513 629 2799 mroberts@graydon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Carlin - MDL NOT ADMITTED +1 214 665 3650
TERMINATED: 09/16/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED G. Allan Van Fleet +1 713 374 3555 +1 713 374 3505 vanfleeta@gtlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan & Hartson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric J. Stock +1 212 918 3000 +1 212 918 3100 EJStock@HHLAW.com
No Logo Reddy Ice Corporation, Defendant

Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Honigman Miller Schwartz & Cohn LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A. Ettinger +1 313 465 7000 dettinger@honigman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas C. Salzenstein +1 313 465 7000 +1 313 465 7542 dsalzenstein@honigman.com
No Logo Reddy Ice Holdings, Incorporated, Defendant

Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Honigman Miller Schwartz & Cohn LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A. Ettinger +1 313 465 7000 dettinger@honigman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas C. Salzenstein +1 313 465 7000 +1 313 465 7542 dsalzenstein@honigman.com
No Logo Lawrence Diamond, Interested Party
Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority, Interested Party
No Logo Mall Mart, Incorporated, Intervenor-Plaintiff
No Logo Packaged Ice Antitrust Litigation, In Re:
Citation No cause code entered
Nature of Suit 410 - Anti-Trust
  Entries (554) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 583 Filed: 6/29/2020, Entered: None Notice - Other
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 582 Filed: 9/19/2019, Entered: None Notice - Other
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 581 Filed: 8/29/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 580 Filed: 8/5/2019, Entered: None Hearing on Motion*
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 579 Filed: 7/5/2019, Entered: None For Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 578 Filed: 2/1/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion - Free
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 577 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: None Hearing on Motion*
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 575 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None Motion - Free
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 574 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: None Appeal Mandate
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 573 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: None Appeal Order/Opinion/Judgment
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 572 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: None Appeal Order/Opinion/Judgment
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 571 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Reconsideration
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 570 Filed: 9/26/2017, Entered: None Reconsideration
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 554 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: None Supplemental Brief
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 553 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: None Order
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 552 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 551 Filed: 7/3/2017, Entered: None Attorney Fees
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 548 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: None Objection - Free
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 547 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: None For Order
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 546 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None Order
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 545 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None Order
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 544 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None Notice - Other
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 543 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: None Application - other
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 542 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Response - Free
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 541 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: None Notice - Other
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 540 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 539 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Objection - Free
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 538 Filed: 12/29/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 537 Filed: 12/29/2016, Entered: None Withdrawal of Attorney
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 536 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 535 Filed: 12/7/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Order
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 534 Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: None Hearing on Motion*
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 533 Filed: 11/27/2016, Entered: None Supplemental Brief
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 532 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Disbursement of funds
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 530 Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: None Hearing on Motion*
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 529 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: None For Order
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 526 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Certify Class
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 517 Filed: 2/15/2016, Entered: None Notice - Other
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 516 Filed: 1/25/2016, Entered: None Requiring Responsive Pleading*
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 515 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 514 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None Hearing on Motion*
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 513 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None Disbursement of funds
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 505 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None Appear*
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 504 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: None Supplemental Brief
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Blank 476 Filed: 11/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          OPINION and ORDER granting 467 Motion for Final Approval Order; granting 468 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DGoo)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 464 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: 8/10/2012 Supplemental Brief
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 463 Filed: 7/25/2012, Entered: 7/25/2012 Order
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 462 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: 7/23/2012 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 461 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: 7/13/2012 Notice to Appear
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 460 Filed: 7/12/2012, Entered: 7/12/2012 Supplemental Brief
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 459 Filed: 7/11/2012, Entered: 7/11/2012 Order
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 458 Filed: 7/11/2012, Entered: 7/11/2012 Transcript
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 457 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: 7/6/2012 Supplemental Brief
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 456 Filed: 7/3/2012, Entered: 7/3/2012 Transcript
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 455 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: 6/22/2012 Motion
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 454 Filed: 6/20/2012, Entered: 6/20/2012 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 453 Filed: 6/20/2012, Entered: 6/20/2012 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 452 Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: 6/19/2012 Supplemental Brief
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 451 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: 6/13/2012 Order on Motion to Sever
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 450 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: 6/12/2012 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 449 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: 6/11/2012 Order
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 448 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: 6/6/2012 Notice of withdrawal of attorney
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 447 Filed: 6/5/2012, Entered: 6/5/2012 Settlement Agreement
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 446 Filed: 5/15/2012, Entered: 5/15/2012 Supplemental Brief
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 445 Filed: 5/11/2012, Entered: 5/11/2012 ~Motion to Sever
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 444 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: 5/8/2012 Objection
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 443 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: 4/13/2012 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 442 Filed: 4/10/2012, Entered: 4/10/2012 Motion to Approve Consent Judgment
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 441 Filed: 3/28/2012, Entered: 3/28/2012 Order on Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 440 Filed: 3/22/2012, Entered: 3/22/2012 Notice to Appear
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 439 Filed: 3/13/2012, Entered: 3/13/2012 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: 3/8/2012 Notice of Change of Address/Contact Information
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 437 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: 3/7/2012 MDL Conditional Transfer Order - Transfer In
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 436 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: 3/5/2012 Order on Motion to Adjourn
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 435 Filed: 3/1/2012, Entered: 3/1/2012 Motion to Adjourn
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 434 Filed: 2/28/2012, Entered: 2/28/2012 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 2/24/2012, Entered: 2/24/2012 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: 2/22/2012 MDL Conditional Transfer Order - Transfer In
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: 2/21/2012 Order
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: 2/16/2012, Entered: 2/16/2012 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 429 Filed: 2/16/2012, Entered: 2/16/2012 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 2/16/2012, Entered: 2/16/2012 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 2/16/2012, Entered: 2/16/2012 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: 2/15/2012 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: 2/14/2012 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: 2/14/2012 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 2/8/2012, Entered: 2/13/2012 MDL Conditional Transfer Order - Transfer In
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 422 Filed: 2/8/2012, Entered: 2/8/2012 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 421 Filed: 2/8/2012, Entered: 2/8/2012 Order on Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 420 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: 1/31/2012 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: 1/31/2012 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 418 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: 1/30/2012 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 417 Filed: 1/19/2012, Entered: 1/19/2012 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 416 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: 1/18/2012 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 1/10/2012, Entered: 1/10/2012 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 414 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: 1/3/2012 Order on Motion for ReconsiderationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying 412 Motion for Reconsideration re 405 Order on Motion to Dismiss,. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DGoo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 413 Filed: 12/29/2011, Entered: 12/29/2011 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 412 Filed: 12/27/2011, Entered: 12/27/2011 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 411 Filed: 12/27/2011, Entered: 12/27/2011 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410 Filed: 12/27/2011, Entered: 12/27/2011 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 12/27/2011, Entered: 12/27/2011 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 408 Filed: 12/27/2011, Entered: 12/27/2011 Notice of withdrawal of attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 12/19/2011, Entered: 12/19/2011 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 406 Filed: 12/13/2011, Entered: 12/13/2011 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                OPINION and ORDER granting 394 Motion for Order; granting 395 Motion for Order; granting in part 396 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DGoo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 405 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: 12/12/2011 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OPINION and ORDER granting in part and denying in part 375 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 376 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DGoo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: 12/7/2011 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 12/1/2011, Entered: 12/1/2011 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: 11/18/2011 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: 11/2/2011 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 10/26/2011, Entered: 10/26/2011 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 399 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: 10/24/2011 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SECOND ORDER, Post In Camera Review, Requiring Production of Certain Recordings/Transcripts Subpoenaed by the Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs not Protected by Statute, Privilege or the Work Product Doctrine. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (LWag)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 398 Filed: 10/24/2011, Entered: 10/24/2011 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER DENYING Defendants' Objections to the Filing of the Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (LWag)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: 10/3/2011 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: 9/28/2011 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: 9/28/2011 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: 9/28/2011 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: 9/27/2011 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: 9/13/2011 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 8/3/2011, Entered: 8/3/2011 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 8/3/2011, Entered: 8/3/2011 Order on Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: 7/29/2011 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: 7/29/2011 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: 7/29/2011 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: 7/26/2011 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: 7/26/2011 Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: 7/22/2011 MDL Conditional Transfer Order - Transfer In
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 7/20/2011, Entered: 7/20/2011 Order on Motion - Free
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: 7/19/2011 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: 7/19/2011 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: 7/19/2011 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: 7/15/2011 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: 7/15/2011 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: 7/12/2011 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: 6/24/2011 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: 6/24/2011 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 6/22/2011, Entered: 6/22/2011 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: 6/7/2011 Order on Motion - Free
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: 6/7/2011 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: 6/6/2011 MDL Conditional Transfer Order - Transfer In
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: 5/31/2011 Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: 5/31/2011 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 368 Filed: 5/26/2011, Entered: 5/26/2011 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 5/25/2011, Entered: 5/25/2011 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 5/25/2011, Entered: 5/25/2011 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 5/24/2011, Entered: 5/24/2011 Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 5/19/2011, Entered: 5/19/2011 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: 5/10/2011 Order on Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: 5/10/2011 Surreply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: 5/9/2011 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 5/5/2011, Entered: 5/5/2011 Surreply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: 5/4/2011 Notice of withdrawal of attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 5/3/2011, Entered: 5/3/2011 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 5/2/2011, Entered: 5/2/2011 Supplemental Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 4/26/2011, Entered: 4/27/2011 MDL Conditional Transfer Order - Transfer In
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 4/26/2011, Entered: 4/26/2011 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 4/21/2011, Entered: 4/21/2011 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 4/12/2011, Entered: 4/12/2011 Notice of Change of Address/Contact Information
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 351 Filed: 4/7/2011, Entered: 4/7/2011 Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 350 Filed: 4/6/2011, Entered: 4/6/2011 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 4/1/2011, Entered: 4/1/2011 Errata Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 4/1/2011, Entered: 4/1/2011 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: 3/30/2011 Amended Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: 3/28/2011 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: 3/28/2011 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: 3/28/2011 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 343 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: 3/28/2011 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: 3/28/2011 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 341 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: 3/28/2011 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 340 Filed: 3/25/2011, Entered: 3/25/2011 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 339 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: 3/21/2011 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 338 Filed: 3/17/2011, Entered: 3/17/2011 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 3/17/2011, Entered: 3/17/2011 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 336 Filed: 3/16/2011, Entered: 3/16/2011 Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 335 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: 3/14/2011 Motion to Adjourn
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 334 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: 3/11/2011 Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 333 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: 3/11/2011 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: 3/9/2011 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: 3/7/2011 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 330 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: 2/28/2011 Notice of Withdrawal of Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 329 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: 2/22/2011 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 328 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: 2/22/2011 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: 2/18/2011 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 326 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: 2/18/2011 Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 325 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: 2/18/2011 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 2/17/2011, Entered: 2/17/2011 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 2/15/2011, Entered: 2/15/2011 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 2/15/2011, Entered: 2/15/2011 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 321 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: 2/11/2011 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 320 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: 2/11/2011 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 319 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: 2/7/2011 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: 2/7/2011 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 317 Filed: 2/1/2011, Entered: 2/1/2011 Notice to Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: 1/31/2011 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 315 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: 1/31/2011 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 314 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: 1/24/2011 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: 1/21/2011 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: 1/14/2011 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: 1/14/2011 Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 1/11/2011, Entered: 1/11/2011 Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 1/11/2011, Entered: 1/11/2011 Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: 1/10/2011 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: 1/7/2011 Order on Motion - Free
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: 1/7/2011 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 12/30/2010, Entered: 12/30/2010 Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 414 Filed: 1/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying 412 Motion for Reconsideration re 405 Order on Motion to Dismiss,. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DGoo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: 12/13/2010 Order on Motion to Disqualify Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 406 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OPINION and ORDER granting 394 Motion for Order; granting 395 Motion for Order; granting in part 396 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DGoo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: 11/16/2010 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 405 Filed: 12/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OPINION and ORDER granting in part and denying in part 375 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 376 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DGoo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: 11/16/2010 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 399 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SECOND ORDER, Post In Camera Review, Requiring Production of Certain Recordings/Transcripts Subpoenaed by the Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs not Protected by Statute, Privilege or the Work Product Doctrine. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (LWag)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: 11/15/2010 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 398 Filed: 10/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER DENYING Defendants' Objections to the Filing of the Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (LWag)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: 11/15/2010 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: 11/15/2010 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 368
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: 11/10/2010 Notice of withdrawal of attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 4/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Filing Transcript. (Lizza, L.) (Entered: 04/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 11/10/2010, Entered: 11/10/2010 Notice of withdrawal of attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 296 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: 11/8/2010 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 351
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 11/8/2010, Entered: 11/8/2010 Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 350
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: 11/4/2010 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 11/2/2010, Entered: 11/2/2010 Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: 10/8/2010 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: 9/30/2010 Order on Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: 9/29/2010 Notice of Change of Address/Contact Information
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: 9/24/2010 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 343
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: 9/20/2010 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 9/16/2010, Entered: 9/16/2010 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 341
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: 9/10/2010 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 340
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 9/2/2010, Entered: 9/2/2010 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 339
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: 9/1/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 338
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: 8/25/2010 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: 8/23/2010 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 336
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: 8/23/2010 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 335
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: 8/23/2010 Order Referring Motion to Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 334
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: 8/17/2010 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 333
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: 8/17/2010 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: 8/16/2010 Order Referring Motion to Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: 8/16/2010 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 330
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 8/4/2010, Entered: 8/4/2010 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 329
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: 8/2/2010 Order on Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 328
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: 8/2/2010 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: 7/26/2010 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 326
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: 7/26/2010 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 325
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: 7/23/2010 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 7/22/2010, Entered: 7/22/2010 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 7/15/2010, Entered: 7/15/2010 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 321
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 7/15/2010, Entered: 7/15/2010 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 320
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: 7/14/2010 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 319
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: 7/14/2010 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: 7/14/2010 Motion to Disqualify Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 317
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: 7/14/2010 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: 7/14/2010 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 315
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: 7/9/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 314
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 260 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: 7/1/2010 Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 296
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: 6/23/2010 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 260
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Failure to Comply with ECF Policies and Procedures as to attorney Shawn-Lee M. Goddard. Bounced NEF for 256 Notice (Other), 257 Notice (Other). (TMcg) (Entered: 06/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Chi-Mar Enterprises, Incorporated (CORRECTED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) Notice of Change of Firm Affiliation and Appearance (Nussbaum, Linda) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Chi-Mar Enterprises, Incorporated Notice of Change of Firm Affiliation and Appearance (Nussbaum, Linda) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen: 209 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Until After Motion to Dismiss is Resolved filed by Arctic Glacier International, Incorporated, Arctic Glacier Income Fund, Arctic Glacier, Incorporated, Home City Ice Company. Signed by District Judge Paul D Borman. (DGoo) (Entered: 04/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of hearing on 203 MOTION to Dismiss Direct Purchasers' Consolidated Amended Complaint, 202 MOTION to Dismiss Direct Purchaser Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 6/24/2010 02:00 PM before District Judge Paul D Borman. (DGoo) (Entered: 04/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Edward A. Baker by Bynarry Ltd., Petro's Beverage Co., Inc.. (Baker, Edward) (Entered: 04/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 3/31/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by James Feeney, Ainello Mancusi, Lawrence J Acker, Brian W Buttars, Linda Desmond, Ron Miastkowski, Perry Peka, Wayne Stanford, Patrick Simasko re 231 Reply to Response to Motion, 207 MOTION to Dismiss The Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Complaint, 224 Affidavit, 222 Response to Motion, 223 Response to Motion,, 208 Joint MOTION to Dismiss the Indirect Purchasers' Amended Class Action Complaint, 230 Reply to Response to Motion, Indirect Purchasers of Supplemental Authority Relating to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Their Amended Class Action Complaint (Wild, Matthew) (Entered: 03/31/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Failure to Comply with ECF Policies and Procedures as to attorney Shawn-Lee M. Goddard. Bounced NEF for 249 Notice. (VLun) (Entered: 03/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 238 Motion for Leave to File TRANSCRIPT EXCERPTS OF FEBRUARY 11 AND MARCH 2, 2010 FROM PARALLEL CRIMINAL PROCEEDINGS. Signed by District Judge Paul D Borman. (DGoo) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 3/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Cobblestone Tequesta, LLC of Change of Firm Name (Mitchell, David) (Entered: 03/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 3/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response re 238 MOTION for Leave to File Transcript Excerpts Containing Recent Statements By The United States Department Of Justice Regarding The Scope Of The Alleged Packaged Ice Conspiracy In Support Of Reddy Ices Motions To Dismiss filed by Reddy Ice Holdings, Incorporated, Reddy Ice Corporation. (Bamberger, David) (Entered: 03/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 3/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting withdrawl re 244 Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney filed by Reddy Ice Corporation, Reddy Ice Holdings, Incorporated. Signed by District Judge Paul D Borman. (DGoo) (Entered: 03/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to 238 MOTION for Leave to File Transcript Excerpts Containing Recent Statements By The United States Department Of Justice Regarding The Scope Of The Alleged Packaged Ice Conspiracy In Support Of Reddy Ices Motions To Dismiss filed by Alvin's Enterprises, Incorporated. (Hoese, William) (Entered: 03/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to 238 MOTION for Leave to File Transcript Excerpts Containing Recent Statements By The United States Department Of Justice Regarding The Scope Of The Alleged Packaged Ice Conspiracy In Support Of Reddy Ices Motions To Dismiss By Indirect Purchasers filed by James Feeney, Ainello Mancusi, Lawrence J Acker, Brian W Buttars, Linda Desmond, Ron Miastkowski, Perry Peka, Wayne Stanford, Patrick Simasko. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B) (Wild, Matthew) (Entered: 03/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: None, Terminated: 3/17/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Mark H Hamer - MDL NOT ADMITTED by Reddy Ice Holdings, Incorporated, Reddy Ice Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Nelson, James) (Entered: 03/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 3/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Daniel Cohen on behalf of Wilson Farms, Incorporated. (Cohen, Daniel) (Entered: 03/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 3/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Failure to Comply with ECF Policies and Procedures as to attorney Mark H Hamer - MDL NOT ADMITTED. Bounced NEF for 241 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel. (TMcg) (Entered: 03/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 3/11/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 239 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by District Judge Paul D Borman. (DGoo) (Entered: 03/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 3/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Failure to Comply with ECF Policies and Procedures as to attorney Mark H Hamer - MDL NOT ADMITTED. Bounced NEF for 239 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Wild Law Group PLLC as interim lead and liaison counsel for indirect purchaser class in place of Law Offices of Max Wild, Perrin Law Firm and Levitt & Kaizer. (TMcg) (Entered: 03/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 3/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Appoint Counsel Wild Law Group PLLC as interim lead and liaison counsel for indirect purchaser class in place of Law Offices of Max Wild, Perrin Law Firm and Levitt & Kaizer by Ainello Mancusi, Lawrence J Acker, Brian W Buttars, Linda Desmond, Perry Peka, Wayne Stanford, Patrick Simasko. (Wild, Matthew) (Entered: 03/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 3/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Transcript Excerpts Containing Recent Statements By The United States Department Of Justice Regarding The Scope Of The Alleged Packaged Ice Conspiracy In Support Of Reddy Ices Motions To Dismiss by Reddy Ice Holdings, Incorporated, Reddy Ice Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Bamberger, David) (Entered: 03/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 2/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            [FILING ERROR - Document is a MOTION] CONSENT Motion For Leave To Submit Additional Information Regarding Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Submission Of Recent Authority On Preliminary Approval Of A Settlement Class by Reddy Ice Holdings, Incorporated, Reddy Ice Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Bamberger, David) Modified on 2/25/2010 (DWor). (Entered: 02/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Alvin's Enterprises, Incorporated Submission of Recent Authority In Response to Joint Motion by the Reddy Ice and Arctic Glacier Defendants To Stay Consideration of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement with the Home City Ice Company (Hoese, William) (Entered: 02/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING re 234 MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Christopher E. Coleman filed by Marchbanks Travel Service, Incorporated. Signed by District Judge Paul D Borman. (DGoo) (Entered: 02/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 1/28/2010, Entered: None, Terminated: 2/1/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Christopher E. Coleman by Marchbanks Travel Service, Incorporated. (Coleman - NOT SWORN, Christopher) (Entered: 01/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 1/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Sanford M. Litvack on behalf of Home City Ice Company. (Litvack, Sanford) (Entered: 01/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER to Strike 229 Supplemental Brief filed by Patrick Simasko, Wayne Stanford, Brian W Buttars, Lawrence J Acker, Ainello Mancusi, Perry Peka, Ron Miastkowski, Linda Desmond, James Feeney, 228 Supplemental Brief, filed by Patrick Simasko, Wayne Stanford, Brian W Buttars, Lawrence J Acker, Ainello Mancusi, Perry Peka, Ron Miastkowski, James Feeney, Linda Desmond. Signed by District Judge Paul D Borman. (DEld) (Entered: 01/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 1/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response re 208 Joint MOTION to Dismiss the Indirect Purchasers' Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Arctic Glacier, Incorporated, Arctic Glacier Income Fund, Arctic Glacier International, Incorporated, Home City Ice Company, Arctic Glaicer California, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix 1) (Roberts, Michael) (Entered: 01/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 1/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response re 207 MOTION to Dismiss The Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by Reddy Ice Holdings, Incorporated, Reddy Ice Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Eliot T. Burriss) (Nelson, James) (Entered: 01/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 1/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            [STRICKEN] SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re 212 Response to Motion,, amended filed by James Feeney, Ainello Mancusi, Lawrence J Acker, Brian W Buttars, Linda Desmond, Ron Miastkowski, Perry Peka, Wayne Stanford, Patrick Simasko. (Perrin, John) Modified on 1/27/2010 (DEld). (Entered: 01/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 1/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              [STRICKEN] SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re 222 Response to Motion, Letter Informing the Court of Recent Decision filed by James Feeney, Ainello Mancusi, Lawrence J Acker, Brian W Buttars, Linda Desmond, Ron Miastkowski, Perry Peka, Wayne Stanford, Patrick Simasko. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Star v. Sony Music BMG Entertainment, # 2 Exhibit Complaint in Chamberlain v. Reddy Ice) (Wild, Matthew) Modified on 1/27/2010 (DEld). (Entered: 01/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 1/11/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Arctic Glacier, Incorporated, Arctic Glacier Income Fund, Arctic Glacier International, Incorporated, Home City Ice Company. (Render, Paula) (Entered: 01/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 12/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response re 203 MOTION to Dismiss Direct Purchasers' Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by Arctic Glacier, Incorporated, Arctic Glacier Income Fund, Arctic Glacier International, Incorporated. (Render, Paula) (Entered: 12/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 12/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response re 202 MOTION to Dismiss Direct Purchaser Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Reddy Ice Holdings, Incorporated, Reddy Ice Corporation. (Bamberger, David) (Entered: 12/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 12/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Max Wild re 222 Response to Motion, Opposition filed by Ainello Mancusi, Lawrence J Acker, Brian W Buttars, Linda Desmond, Ron Miastkowski, Perry Peka, Wayne Stanford, Patrick Simasko. (Wild, Matthew) Modified on 12/24/2009 (CGre). [DUPLICATE OF 223] (Entered: 12/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 12/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to 207 MOTION to Dismiss The Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Complaint, 208 Joint MOTION to Dismiss the Indirect Purchasers' Amended Class Action Complaint Declaration of Matthew S. Wild filed by James Feeney, Ainello Mancusi, Lawrence J Acker, Brian W Buttars, Linda Desmond, Perry Peka, Wayne Stanford, Patrick Simasko. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C) (Wild, Matthew) Modified on 12/24/2009 (CGre). [WRONG EVENT USED - THIS IS THE DECLARATION OF MATTHEW WILD AND EXHIBITS] (Entered: 12/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to 207 MOTION to Dismiss The Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Complaint, 208 Joint MOTION to Dismiss the Indirect Purchasers' Amended Class Action Complaint Brief in Opposition filed by James Feeney, Ainello Mancusi, Lawrence J Acker, Brian W Buttars, Linda Desmond, Ron Miastkowski, Perry Peka, Wayne Stanford. (Wild, Matthew) (Entered: 12/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response re 211 Joint MOTION to Stay re 206 MOTION DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF PROPOSED SETTLEMENT WITH THE HOME CITY ICE COMPANY AND FOR AUTHORIZATION TO DISSEMINATE NOTICEJoint MOTION to Stay re 206 MOTION DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF PROPOSED SETTLEMENT WITH THE HOME CITY ICE COMPANY AND FOR AUTHORIZATION TO DISSEMINATE NOTICEJoint MOTION to Stay re 206 MOTION DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF PROPOSED SETTLEMENT WITH THE HOME CITY ICE COMPANY AND FOR AUTHORIZATION TO DISSEMINATE NOTICE filed by Arctic Glacier, Incorporated, Arctic Glacier Income Fund, Arctic Glacier International, Incorporated, Reddy Ice Holdings, Incorporated, Reddy Ice Corporation, Arctic Glaicer California, Incorporated. (Bamberger, David) (Entered: 12/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 12/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Failure to Comply with ECF Policies and Procedures as to attorney Mark H Hamer - MDL NOT ADMITTED. Bounced NEF for 219 Reply to Response to Motion. (VLun) (Entered: 12/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 12/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response re 211 Joint MOTION to Stay re 206 MOTION DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF PROPOSED SETTLEMENT WITH THE HOME CITY ICE COMPANY AND FOR AUTHORIZATION TO DISSEMINATE NOTICEJoint MOTION to Stay re 206 MOTION DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF PROPOSED SETTLEMENT WITH THE HOME CITY ICE COMPANY AND FOR AUTHORIZATION TO DISSEMINATE NOTICEJoint MOTION to Stay re 206 MOTION DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF PROPOSED SETTLEMENT WITH THE HOME CITY ICE COMPANY AND FOR AUTHORIZATION TO DISSEMINATE NOTICE filed by Arctic Glacier, Incorporated, Arctic Glacier Income Fund, Arctic Glacier International, Incorporated, Reddy Ice Holdings, Incorporated, Reddy Ice Corporation, Arctic Glaicer California, Incorporated. (Bamberger, David) (Entered: 12/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 12/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to 211 Joint MOTION to Stay re 206 MOTION DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF PROPOSED SETTLEMENT WITH THE HOME CITY ICE COMPANY AND FOR AUTHORIZATION TO DISSEMINATE NOTICEJoint MOTION to Stay re 206 MOTION DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF PROPOSED SETTLEMENT WITH THE HOME CITY ICE COMPANY AND FOR AUTHORIZATION TO DISSEMINATE NOTICEJoint MOTION to Stay re 206 MOTION DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF PROPOSED SETTLEMENT WITH THE HOME CITY ICE COMPANY AND FOR AUTHORIZATION TO DISSEMINATE NOTICE filed by Home City Ice Company. (Roberts, Michael) (Entered: 12/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 12/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response re 209 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Until After Motion to Dismiss is Resolved filed by Arctic Glacier, Incorporated, Arctic Glacier Income Fund, Arctic Glacier International, Incorporated, Home City Ice Company. (Hirst, Melissa) (Entered: 12/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 12/16/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting in part and denying in part 215 Motion for Leave to File, and that the indirect purchaser plaintiffs motion is GRANTED as to 30 pagesonly.. Signed by District Judge Paul D Borman. (DGoo) (Entered: 12/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 12/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File a Brief Not to Exceed 50 Pages by Lawrence J Acker, Brian W Buttars, Linda Desmond, Ron Miastkowski, Perry Peka, Wayne Stanford, Patrick Simasko. (Perrin, John) (Entered: 12/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to 211 Joint MOTION to Stay re 206 MOTION DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF PROPOSED SETTLEMENT WITH THE HOME CITY ICE COMPANY AND FOR AUTHORIZATION TO DISSEMINATE NOTICEJoint MOTION to Stay re 206 MOTION DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF PROPOSED SETTLEMENT WITH THE HOME CITY ICE COMPANY AND FOR AUTHORIZATION TO DISSEMINATE NOTICEJoint MOTION to Stay re 206 MOTION DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF PROPOSED SETTLEMENT WITH THE HOME CITY ICE COMPANY AND FOR AUTHORIZATION TO DISSEMINATE NOTICE filed by Suzie's Investments, Inc. d/b/a Checker Drugs and Food, Alvin's Enterprises, Incorporated, Polly's Food Service, Incorporated, Kenco, Incorporated, Arkansas Garden Center West, LLC, Arkansas Garden Center North, LLC, Kingsway Enterprises, Incorporated, Thomas Beverage Company, Incorporated, Chi-Mar Enterprises, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L) (Hoese, William) (Entered: 12/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 12/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to 209 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Until After Motion to Dismiss is Resolved filed by Ainello Mancusi, Lawrence J Acker, Brian W Buttars, Linda Desmond, Ron Miastkowski, Perry Peka, Wayne Stanford, Patrick Simasko. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Article) (Wild, Matthew) (Entered: 12/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to 202 MOTION to Dismiss Direct Purchaser Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint, 203 MOTION to Dismiss Direct Purchasers' Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by Suzie's Investments, Inc. d/b/a Checker Drugs and Food, Alvin's Enterprises, Incorporated, Polly's Food Service, Incorporated, Kenco, Incorporated, Arkansas Garden Center West, LLC, Arkansas Garden Center North, LLC, Kingsway Enterprises, Incorporated, Thomas Beverage Company, Incorporated, Chi-Mar Enterprises, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint) (Hoese, William) (Entered: 11/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Stay re 206 MOTION DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF PROPOSED SETTLEMENT WITH THE HOME CITY ICE COMPANY AND FOR AUTHORIZATION TO DISSEMINATE NOTICE by Arctic Glacier, Incorporated, Arctic Glacier Income Fund, Arctic Glacier International, Incorporated, Reddy Ice Holdings, Incorporated, Reddy Ice Corporation, Arctic Glaicer California, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Document Continuation Brief in Support of Joint Motion, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit1) (Bamberger, David) (Entered: 11/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Aaron Patton - MDL NOT ADMITTED by Baron Group, Incorporated. (Patton - MDL NOT ADMITTED, Aaron) (Entered: 11/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Until After Motion to Dismiss is Resolved by Arctic Glacier, Incorporated, Arctic Glacier Income Fund, Arctic Glacier International, Incorporated, Home City Ice Company. (Render, Paula) (Entered: 11/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION to Dismiss the Indirect Purchasers' Amended Class Action Complaint by Arctic Glacier, Incorporated, Arctic Glacier Income Fund, Arctic Glacier International, Incorporated, Home City Ice Company. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A - Summary of State Law Arguments, # 3 Exhibit B - Kansas Order Dismissing Case, # 4 Exhibit C - Home City Plea Agreement, # 5 Exhibit D - Arctic Plea Agreement) (Render, Paula) (Entered: 11/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss The Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Complaint by Reddy Ice Holdings, Incorporated, Reddy Ice Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Nelson, James) (Entered: 11/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 11/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF PROPOSED SETTLEMENT WITH THE HOME CITY ICE COMPANY AND FOR AUTHORIZATION TO DISSEMINATE NOTICE by Suzie's Investments, Inc. d/b/a Checker Drugs and Food, Alvin's Enterprises, Incorporated, Polly's Food Service, Incorporated, Kenco, Incorporated, Arkansas Garden Center West, LLC, Arkansas Garden Center North, LLC, Kingsway Enterprises, Incorporated, Thomas Beverage Company, Incorporated, Chi-Mar Enterprises, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Settlement Agreement and Exhibits thereto, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Mailed Notice, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Proposed Summary Notice) (Hoese, William) (Entered: 11/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 11/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING THE TIME FOR THE HOME CITY ICE COMPANY TO MOVE, ANSWER, OR OTHERWISE PLEAD IN RESPONSE TO THE AMENDEDCONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT OF THE DIRECT PURCHASERS Signed by District Judge Paul D Borman. (DGoo) (Entered: 11/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 11/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time and page limits re 198 Amended Complaint,, Signed by District Judge Paul D Borman. (DGoo) (Entered: 11/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 10/30/2009, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss Direct Purchasers' Consolidated Amended Complaint by Arctic Glacier, Incorporated, Arctic Glacier Income Fund, Arctic Glacier International, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits Exhibit List, # 2 Exhibit Ex. A - Home City Plea, # 3 Exhibit Ex. B - McNulty Complaint) (Render, Paula) (Entered: 10/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 10/30/2009, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss Direct Purchaser Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint by Reddy Ice Holdings, Incorporated, Reddy Ice Corporation. (Bamberger, David) (Entered: 10/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 10/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION EXTENDING THE TIME FOR THE HOME CITY ICE COMPANY TO MOVE, ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD IN RESPONSE TO THE AMENDED CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT OF THE DIRECT PURCHASERS by Home City Ice Company (Roberts, Michael) (Entered: 10/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 200 Filed: 9/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Andrew J. Morganti by JBZ, Inc., Public Foods, Incorporated, Americana Food Store, Incorporated, Twin Value, LLC. (Novak, Paul) (Entered: 09/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 199 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Class Action Complaint filed by James Feeney, Ainello Mancusi, Lawrence J Acker, Brian W Buttars, Linda Desmond, Ron Miastkowski, Perry Peka, Wayne Stanford, Patrick Simasko against all defendants. (Wild, Matthew) (Entered: 09/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 198 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand - Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Suzie's Investments, Inc. d/b/a Checker Drugs and Food, Alvin's Enterprises, Incorporated, Polly's Food Service, Incorporated, Kenco, Incorporated, Arkansas Garden Center West, LLC, Arkansas Garden Center North, LLC, Kingsway Enterprises, Incorporated, Thomas Beverage Company, Incorporated, Chi-Mar Enterprises, Incorporated against Arctic Glacier, Incorporated, Arctic Glacier Income Fund, Arctic Glacier International, Incorporated, Reddy Ice Holdings, Incorporated, Reddy Ice Corporation, Home City Ice Company. (LaRocca, Robert) (Entered: 09/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 8/21/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 196 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney.. Signed by District Judge Paul D Borman. (DGoo) (Entered: 08/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 8/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Appearance of Mary Lynne Calkins by Cobblestone Tequesta, LLC. (Mitchell, David) (Entered: 08/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 8/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Failure to Comply with ECF Policies and Procedures as to attorney Mary Lynne Calkins - MDL NOT ADMITTED. (DeSa) (Entered: 08/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 8/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Ridge Plaza, Incorporated, Boone's Opportunity, Incorporated, Karen's Pantry, Incorporated of Change of Firm Address (Zuccarini, John) (Entered: 08/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 8/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Ridge Plaza, Incorporated, Boone's Opportunity, Incorporated, Karen's Pantry, Incorporated of Change of Firm Address (Simon, Elwood) (Entered: 08/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 8/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Arctic Glacier, Incorporated (Render, Paula) (Entered: 08/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 8/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Arctic Glacier International, Incorporated (Render, Paula) (Entered: 08/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 8/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Arctic Glacier Income Fund (Render, Paula) (Entered: 08/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 8/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Failure to Comply with ECF Policies and Procedures as to attorney Mary Lynne Calkins - MDL NOT ADMITTED. (ATee) (Entered: 08/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 8/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Lee Albert - MDL NOT ADMITTED on behalf of Tahira Firdous. (Albert - MDL NOT ADMITTED, Lee) (Entered: 08/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 8/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by 6th & Island Investments, LLC, Market Street Investment, LLC, Universal Hillcrest, LLC, Gaslamp Country Club, LLC of Change of Address of Counsel (Wienner, S.) (Entered: 08/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Emergency MOTION to Expedite Discovery to Serve Non-Party Subpoenas by Lawrence J Acker, Brian W Buttars, Linda Desmond, Ron Miastkowski, Perry Peka, Wayne Stanford, Patrick Simasko. (Wild, Matthew) (Entered: 07/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 7/17/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO 1. Signed by District Judge Paul D Borman. (DGoo) (Entered: 07/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 7/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michael S. Cafferty appearing on behalf of Alvin's Enterprises, Incorporated (Cafferty, Michael) (Entered: 07/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 6/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by John Malkinson - MDL NOT ADMITTED on behalf of Joseph Difabritiis 7-11 Food Store 24428. (Malkinson - MDL NOT ADMITTED, John) (Entered: 06/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 6/16/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE TO APPEAR: Status Conference set for 7/17/2009 03:00 PM before District Judge Paul D Borman (DGoo) (Entered: 06/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 6/16/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE TO APPEAR: Status Conference set for 7/17/2009 02:00 PM before District Judge Paul D Borman (DGoo) (Entered: 06/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 6/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed.. (Wild, Matthew) (Entered: 06/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 6/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed.. (Wild, Matthew) (Entered: 06/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 6/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed.. (Wild, Matthew) (Entered: 06/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 6/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed.. (Wild, Matthew) (Entered: 06/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 6/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew S. Wild on behalf of Lawrence J Acker, Brian W Buttars, Linda Desmond, Ron Miastkowski, Wayne Stanford, Patrick Simasko. (Wild, Matthew) (Entered: 06/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OPINION and ORDER granting 112 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting 124 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by District Judge Paul D Borman. (DGoo) (Entered: 06/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 5/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Filing Transcript. (Lizza, L.) (Entered: 05/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 5/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Hearing To Select Lead Plaintiff Counsel held on 03/16/2009. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Leann S. Lizza) (Number of Pages: 123) Redaction Request due 6/4/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/15/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/12/2009. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Lizza, L.) (Entered: 05/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 4/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Filing Transcript. (Lizza, L.) (Entered: 04/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 4/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Excerpt of Hearing To Select Lead Plaintiff Counsel held on 03/16/2009. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Leann S. Lizza) (Number of Pages: 16) Redaction Request due 5/13/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/26/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/21/2009. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Lizza, L.) (Entered: 04/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Harold Z. Gurewitz on behalf of Alvin's Enterprises, Incorporated. (Gurewitz, Harold) (Entered: 03/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Mazel LLC(08-11315) re 162 Notice (Other) Notice of Withdrawal of Intention to Appear at March 16, 2009 Hearing (Docket No. 162), and Notice of Withdrawal of Request to Appoint Lead Counsel (Docket No. 105) (Aranoff, Ronald) (Entered: 03/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 3/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Paul F. Novak appearing on behalf of Public Foods, Incorporated, Americana Food Store, Incorporated, Twin Value, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Novak, Paul) (Entered: 03/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 3/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Robert N Kaplan - MDL NOT ADMITTED on behalf of Public Foods, Incorporated, Americana Food Store, Incorporated, Twin Value, LLC. (Kaplan - MDL NOT ADMITTED, Robert) (Entered: 03/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 3/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Andrew J. Morganti appearing on behalf of Public Foods, Incorporated, Americana Food Store, Incorporated, Twin Value, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Morganti, Andrew) (Entered: 03/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE TO APPEAR: Hearing to select lead plaintiff set for 3/16/2009 08:30 AM before District Judge Paul D Borman (DGoo) (Entered: 03/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 3/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jeffrey T. Meyers appearing on behalf of Farm Stores Corporation (Meyers, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 3/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Failure to Comply with ECF Policies and Procedures as to attorney Chad M McManamy - MDL NOT ADMITTED. [DOCUMENTS 157-160,162] (DHam) (Entered: 03/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Mazel LLC(08-11315) re 144 Notice to Appear Notice Of Intention To Appear At Hearing On March 16, 2009 To Determine Appointment Of Class Counsel (Aranoff, Ronald) (Entered: 03/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Warrington Fuels, Incorporated, Chi-Mar Enterprises, Incorporated (Miller, E.) (Entered: 03/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Failure to Comply with ECF Policies and Procedures as to attorney Chad M McManamy - MDL NOT ADMITTED. (DHam) Modified on 3/2/2009 (DHam). [DOCUMENTS FILED 02/24-27/09] (Entered: 03/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by John M. Perrin on behalf of Lawrence J Acker, Brian W Buttars, Linda Desmond, Ron Miastkowski, Perry Peka, Wayne Stanford, Patrick Simasko. (Perrin, John) (Entered: 03/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Jenifer Valencia, Jennin Gil, Tommy Williams, Thomas F Prazan, Marcellino E Bryant, Patrick Reeners, James Taylor, Wayne Sydor, Jeff Manry, Jan Barranco-Grams Of Intention To Appear At March 16, 2009 Hearing and Seek Appointment as Lead Counsel For the Indirect Purchaser Class (Barnow - MDL NOT ADMITTED, Ben) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Cobblestone Tequesta, LLC re 144 Notice to Appear Notice of Intention to Appear at Hearing on March 16, 2009 and Seek Appointment as Interim Lead Counsel and Interim Liaison Counsel for the Direct Purchaser Class (Mitchell - MDL NOT ADMITTED, David) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph J. Tabacco on behalf of Farm Stores Corporation. (Tabacco, Joseph) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 2/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Joseph Difabritiis 7-11 Food Store 24428, Elite Energy, LLC, Springfield Exxon, LLC, Kozak Enterprises, Incorporated, Kopilenko International Wines & Liquors, Incorporated, Thomas Beverage Company, Incorporated re 144 Notice to Appear At Hearing on March 16, 2009 to Determine Appointment of Class Counsel (Wierenga, Robert) (Entered: 02/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 2/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Ridge Plaza, Incorporated, Silver Springs Liquor Incorporated, Mall Mart, Incorporated, Baron Group, Incorporated, Meleen Corporation, Arkansas Garden Center West, LLC, Arkansas Garden Center North, LLC, JA-WY, Inc, Solid Waste, Limited, Thrifty Liquor, Incorporated, House of Faith, Incorporated, Kingsway Enterprises, Incorporated, GM Food and Fuel, LLC, Boone's Opportunity, Incorporated, Karen's Pantry, Incorporated re 144 Notice to Appear at March 16, 2009 Hearing and to Seek Appointment as Interim Lead Counsel for the Direct Purchaser Class (Simon, Elwood) (Entered: 02/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 2/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Warrington Fuels, Incorporated, Chi-Mar Enterprises, Incorporated NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF KAPLAN FOX & KILSHEIMER LLP AT HEARING ON MARCH 16, 2009 TO DETERMINE APPOINTMENT OF CLASS COUNSEL (Kaplan - MDL NOT ADMITTED, Robert) (Entered: 02/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Eugene A. Spector on behalf of Ethamma Emmanuel, Charlie Holland Motors, Incorporated. (Spector, Eugene)[NOTICE TO APPEAR AT HEARING] Modified on 2/24/2009 (PPau). (Entered: 02/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Failure to Comply with ECF Policies and Procedures as to attorney Chad M McManamy - MDL NOT ADMITTED - DATES 02/20-24/09. (DHam) (Entered: 02/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Alvin's Enterprises, Incorporated re 144 Notice to Appear at hearing on March 16, 2009 by Kohn, Swift & Graf,. P.C., and Gurewitz & Raben, PLLC (LaRocca, Robert) (Entered: 02/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Bynarry Ltd., Petro's Beverage Co., Inc. re 144 Notice to Appear Notice of Intention to Appear at Hearing on March 16, 2009 to Determine Appointment of Class Counsel (Drubel, Richard) (Entered: 02/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 2/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Joseph Massino, Rick Drontle re 144 Notice to Appear of Heins Mills & Olson, P.L.C. at Hearing to Determine Appointment of Class Counsel (Googasian, Dean) (Entered: 02/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 2/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Jay L Himes - MDL Not Admitted on behalf of Ridge Plaza, Incorporated. (Himes - MDL Not Admitted, Jay) (Entered: 02/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by S and S Lima, Incorporated re 144 Notice to Appear Notice of Intention to Appear at March 16, 2009 Hearing and Seek Appointment as Interim Lead Counsel (Cafferty, Patrick) (Entered: 02/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 2/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Marin Scotty's Market, Incorporated, Hamid Amini re 144 Notice to Appear Notice Of Intention To Appear At Hearing On March 16, 2009 And Seek Appointment As Interim Lead Counsel For The Direct Purchaser Class (Alioto - MDL NOT ADMITTED, Mario) (Entered: 02/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 2/18/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE TO APPEAR: Miscellaneous Hearing set for 3/16/2009 10:00 AM before District Judge Paul D Borman (DGoo) (Entered: 02/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 2/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Patton - MDL NOT ADMITTED on behalf of Baron Group, Incorporated. (Patton - MDL NOT ADMITTED, Aaron) (Entered: 02/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 2/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney John D Fabian - MDL NOT ADMITTED and Edmund W Searby- MDL NOT ADMITTED by Fu-Wah Mini Market, Warrington Fuels, Incorporated, Marchbanks Travel Service, Incorporated, Juniata Mobil, Chi-Mar Enterprises, Incorporated. (Gross, Stephen) (Entered: 02/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by 6th & Island Investments, LLC, Market Street Investment, LLC, Universal Hillcrest, LLC, Gaslamp Country Club, LLC of Firm Name Change (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Wienner, S.) (Entered: 01/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Farm Stores Corporation of Change of Firm Name and Office Address (Bushell, Daniel) (Entered: 01/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 1/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Jon King - MDL NOT ADMITTED by Wilson Farms, Incorporated. (Lehmann - MDL NOT ADMITTED, Michael) (Entered: 01/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response re 103 MOTION to Seal Motion for Leave to File Under Seal and for in Camera Review of a Document in Support of the Appointment of Boies, Schiller & Flexner LLP as Interim Lead Counsel for the Direct Purchaser Antitrust Class filed by Bynarry Ltd., Petro's Beverage Co., Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1 Hammond v. Solutia, Inc., # 3 Exhibit 2 In re Graphics Processing Units, # 4 Exhibit 3 In re Cathode Ray Tube, # 5 Exhibit 4 Declaration of Philip J. Iovieno) (Drubel, Richard) (Entered: 12/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER to Strike 130 Response to Motion, 135 Reply to Response to Motion, 134 Response to Motion, 127 Response to Motion and 129 Reply to Response to Motion. Signed by District Judge Paul D Borman. (KMil) (Entered: 12/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED 132 MOTION OF SPECTOR ROSEMAN KODROFF & WILLIS, P.C. TO SUBSTITUTE THE DECLARATION OF JEFFREY J. CORRIGAN FOR THE UNREDACTED MEMORANDUM ORIGINALLY INTENDED TO BE FILED UNDER SEAL IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO BE APPOINTED INTERIM LEAD COUNSEL by Ethamma Emmanuel -Order Related to Document Number 132- (Spector, Eugene) Modified on 12/16/2008 (BSoc). [DOCUMENT FILED IS NOT AN AMENDED MOTION, BUT AN UNSIGNED ORDER] (Entered: 12/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 12/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response re 87 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Plaintiffs Marin Scotty's Market. Inc. and Hamid Amini dba Aminis' By The Bay's Notice Of Motion And Motion For Appointment Of Interim Lead Counsel For The Direct Purchaser Class; Memorandum of Law In Suppor filed by Marin Scotty's Market, Incorporated, Hamid Amini. [STRICKEN] (Alioto - MDL NOT ADMITTED, Mario) Modified on 12/15/2008 (KMil). (Entered: 12/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to 119 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion to Appoint Lead and Liaison Counsel and Memorandum in Support for the Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, 121 MOTION to Appoint Counsel /The Ridge Plaza Plaintiffs Joint Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Appoint Labaton Sucharow LLP as Interim Lead Counsel and Elwood S. Simon & Associates P.C. as Interim Liaison Counsel for the Direct Purchaser Cla, 112 MOTION to Appoint Counsel - Appointment of Lead Counsel (Kohn, Swift & Graf, P.C.) and Liaison Counsel (Gurewitz & Raben, PLLC) MOTION to Appoint Counsel - Appointment of Lead Counsel (Kohn, Swift & Graf, P.C.) and Liaison Counsel (Gurewitz & Raben, PLLC), 106 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion to Appoint The Miller Law Firm, P.C. as Liaison Counsel and Kaplan Fox as Co-Lead Counsel, 100 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion for Appointment of Boies, Schiller & Flexner LLP as Interim Lead Counsel for the Direct Purchaser Antitrust Class, 115 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Response to Other Plaintiffs' Motions to Appoint Lead and Liaison Counsel filed by Farm Stores Corporation. (Bushell, Daniel) [STRICKEN] Modified on 12/15/2008 (KMil). (Entered: 12/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 12/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Ethamma Emmanuel of withdrawal of 120 MOTION re 119 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion to Appoint Lead and Liaison Counsel and Memorandum in Support for the Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs for Entry of an Order Allowing Filing of Unredacted Memorandum of Law MOTION re 119 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion to Appoint Lead and Liaison Counsel and Memorandum in Support for the Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs for Entry of an Order Allowing Filing of Unredacted Memorandum of Law. (Spector, Eugene) (Entered: 12/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 12/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION OF SPECTOR ROSEMAN KODROFF & WILLIS, P.C. TO SUBSTITUTE THE DECLARATION OF JEFFREY J. CORRIGAN FOR THE UNREDACTED MEMORANDUM ORIGINALLY INTENDED TO BE FILED UNDER SEAL IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO BE APPOINTED INTERIM LEAD COUNSEL by Ethamma Emmanuel. (Attachments: # 1 Document Continuation Memo in Support of Motion, # 2 Exhibit A- Declaration of Jeffrey J. Corrigan) (Spector, Eugene) (Entered: 12/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 12/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Marc H. Edelson on behalf of Fu-Wah Mini Market. (Edelson, Marc) (Entered: 12/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to 119 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion to Appoint Lead and Liaison Counsel and Memorandum in Support for the Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, 121 MOTION to Appoint Counsel /The Ridge Plaza Plaintiffs Joint Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Appoint Labaton Sucharow LLP as Interim Lead Counsel and Elwood S. Simon & Associates P.C. as Interim Liaison Counsel for the Direct Purchaser Cla, 120 MOTION re 119 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion to Appoint Lead and Liaison Counsel and Memorandum in Support for the Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs for Entry of an Order Allowing Filing of Unredacted Memorandum of Law MOTION re 119 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion to Appoint Lead and Liaison Counsel and Memorandum in Support for the Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs for Entry of an Order Allowing Filing of Unredacted Memorandum of Law, 112 MOTION to Appoint Counsel - Appointment of Lead Counsel (Kohn, Swift & Graf, P.C.) and Liaison Counsel (Gurewitz & Raben, PLLC) MOTION to Appoint Counsel - Appointment of Lead Counsel (Kohn, Swift & Graf, P.C.) and Liaison Counsel (Gurewitz & Raben, PLLC), 87 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Plaintiffs Marin Scotty's Market. Inc. and Hamid Amini dba Aminis' By The Bay's Notice Of Motion And Motion For Appointment Of Interim Lead Counsel For The Direct Purchaser Class; Memorandum of Law In Suppor, 100 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion for Appointment of Boies, Schiller & Flexner LLP as Interim Lead Counsel for the Direct Purchaser Antitrust Class, 115 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Joseph Difabritiis 7-11 Food Store 24428, Elite Energy, LLC, Springfield Exxon, LLC, Kozak Enterprises, Incorporated, Kopilenko International Wines & Liquors, Incorporated, Thomas Beverage Company, Incorporated. (Wierenga, Robert) [STRICKEN] Modified on 12/15/2008 (KMil). (Entered: 12/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response re 112 MOTION to Appoint Counsel - Appointment of Lead Counsel (Kohn, Swift & Graf, P.C.) and Liaison Counsel (Gurewitz & Raben, PLLC) MOTION to Appoint Counsel - Appointment of Lead Counsel (Kohn, Swift & Graf, P.C.) and Liaison Counsel (Gurewitz & Raben, PLLC) and certificate of service filed by Alvin's Enterprises, Incorporated. (LaRocca, Robert) [STRICKEN] Modified on 12/15/2008 (KMil). (Entered: 12/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 12/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Rachna B Sullivan - MDL NOT ADMITTED and Todd A. Wind by Home City Ice Company. (Roberts - MDL NOT ADMITTED, Michael) (Entered: 12/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 12/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to 103 MOTION to Seal Motion for Leave to File Under Seal and for in Camera Review of a Document in Support of the Appointment of Boies, Schiller & Flexner LLP as Interim Lead Counsel for the Direct Purchaser Antitrust Class, 120 MOTION re 119 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion to Appoint Lead and Liaison Counsel and Memorandum in Support for the Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs for Entry of an Order Allowing Filing of Unredacted Memorandum of Law MOTION re 119 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion to Appoint Lead and Liaison Counsel and Memorandum in Support for the Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs for Entry of an Order Allowing Filing of Unredacted Memorandum of Law filed by Arctic Glacier, Incorporated, Arctic Glacier Income Fund, Arctic Glacier International, Incorporated, Reddy Ice Holdings, Incorporated, Reddy Ice Corporation. (Render, Paula)[STRICKEN] Modified on 12/15/2008 (KMil). Modified on 12/16/2008 (DGoo). (Entered: 12/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 11/26/2008, Entered: None Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Amend/Correct 124 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Lawrence J Acker, Brian W Buttars, Linda Desmond, Ron Miastkowski, Perry Peka, Patrick Simasko. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit) (Perrin, John) (Entered: 11/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 11/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EXHIBIT re 124 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Lawrence J Acker, Brian W Buttars, Linda Desmond, Ron Miastkowski, Perry Peka, Patrick Simasko (Perrin, John) (Entered: 11/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 11/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Lawrence J Acker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit) (Perrin, John) (Entered: 11/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 11/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to 86 Order of November 10, 2008 by Lawrence Diamond, Southeastern Pennsylvania Transportation Authority. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1: November 10, 2008 Order, # 3 Exhibit 2: Dutton v. Healthcare Memorandum, # 4 Exhibit 3: Coughlin Stoia Resume, # 5 Exhibit 4: Barroway Topaz Resume) (Wyman, Debra) (Entered: 11/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 11/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION by Bernard Persky re 121 MOTION to Appoint Counsel /The Ridge Plaza Plaintiffs Joint Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Appoint Labaton Sucharow LLP as Interim Lead Counsel and Elwood S. Simon & Associates P.C. as Interim Liaison Counsel for the Direct Purchaser Cla filed by Ridge Plaza, Incorporated (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D) (Reiss - MDL NOT ADMITTED, William) (Entered: 11/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 11/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Appoint Counsel /The Ridge Plaza Plaintiffs Joint Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Appoint Labaton Sucharow LLP as Interim Lead Counsel and Elwood S. Simon & Associates P.C. as Interim Liaison Counsel for the Direct Purchaser Class by Ridge Plaza, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix of Unpublished Opinions Cited) (Reiss - MDL NOT ADMITTED, William) (Entered: 11/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 11/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION re 119 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion to Appoint Lead and Liaison Counsel and Memorandum in Support for the Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs for Entry of an Order Allowing Filing of Unredacted Memorandum of Law by Ethamma Emmanuel, Charlie Holland Motors, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Memorandum of Law with Certificate of Service) (Spector, Eugene) (Entered: 11/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 11/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion to Appoint Lead and Liaison Counsel and Memorandum in Support for the Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs by Ethamma Emmanuel, Charlie Holland Motors, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Eugene A. Spector with Exhibit, # 2 Declaration of Jeffrey J. Corrigan, # 3 Declaration of E. Powell Miller with Exhibits, # 4 Proposed Order, # 5 Memorandum of Law and Certificate of Service) (Spector, Eugene) (Entered: 11/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 11/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Appoint Counsel for the Indirect Purchaser Class by Jenifer Valencia, Jennin Gil, Tommy Williams, Thomas F Prazan, Marcellino E Bryant, Patrick Reeners, James Taylor, Wayne Sydor, Jeff Manry, Jan Barranco-Grams. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A - list of indirect purchaser cases, # 3 Exhibit B - Resume of Ben Barnow, # 4 Exhibit C - resumes of proposed members of an Indirect Purchaser Class Executive Committee, # 5 Exhibit D - proposed order re Lead Counsel for the Indirect Purchaser Class, # 6 Exhibit E - proposed order - Lead Counsel for an Indirect Purchaser Class and an Executive Committee) (Barnow - MDL NOT ADMITTED, Ben) (Entered: 11/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 11/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION by David Mitchell re 115 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Cobblestone Tequesta, LLC, 6th & Island Investments, LLC, Market Street Investment, LLC, Universal Hillcrest, LLC, Gaslamp Country Club, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Firm Resume, Coughlin Stoia Geller Rudman & Robbins, # 2 Exhibit B - Firm Resume, Scott + Scott LLP, # 3 Exhibit C - Firm Resume, Wienner & Gould, P.C.) (Wienner, S.) (Entered: 11/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 11/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion to Appoint Lead and Liaison Counsel and Memorandum in Support by Farm Stores Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Jose Garcia-Pedrosa, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Joseph J. Tabacco, Jr., # 4 Exhibit 2A - Berman DeValerio Firm Resume) (Bushell, Daniel) (Entered: 11/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 11/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Cobblestone Tequesta, LLC, 6th & Island Investments, LLC, Market Street Investment, LLC, Universal Hillcrest, LLC, Gaslamp Country Club, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Wienner, S.) (Entered: 11/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 11/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Bynarry Ltd., Petro's Beverage Co., Inc. re 113 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Appointment of Boies, Schiller & Flexner LLP as Interim Lead Counsel for the Direct Purchaser Antitrust Class Notice Regarding Corrected Version of Brief (Drubel, Richard) (Entered: 11/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 11/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM Corrected Brief in Support of Motion for Appointment of Boies, Schiller & Flexner LLP as Interim Lead Counsel for the Direct Purchaser Antitrust Class by Bynarry Ltd., Petro's Beverage Co., Inc. (Drubel, Richard) (Entered: 11/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 11/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Appoint Counsel - Appointment of Lead Counsel (Kohn, Swift & Graf, P.C.) and Liaison Counsel (Gurewitz & Raben, PLLC) by Alvin's Enterprises, Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A - List of pending direct, indirect & securities cases, # 3 Exhibit B - attorney resumes, # 4 Exhibit C - Lysine Antitrust Litig. Order, # 5 Exhibit D - Compact Disc Antitrust Litig. Order) (LaRocca, Robert) (Entered: 11/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 11/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION by Sami Rashid re 105 Memorandum filed by Mazel LLC(08-11315), Mazel LLC (Olijnyk, Martha) (Entered: 11/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 11/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM re 106 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion to Appoint The Miller Law Firm, P.C. as Liaison Counsel and Kaplan Fox as Co-Lead Counsel by F & V Oil Company, Inc., Juniata Mobil (Goldberg, Jacob) (Entered: 11/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 11/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM re 86 Order by Rick Drontle (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit Heins Mills & Olson, P.L.C. Firm Resume, # 3 Exhibit The Googasian Firm, P.C. Firm Resume) (Googasian, Dean) (Entered: 11/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 11/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION by David H. Fink re 106 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion to Appoint The Miller Law Firm, P.C. as Liaison Counsel and Kaplan Fox as Co-Lead Counsel filed by Chi-Mar Enterprises, Incorporated (Olijnyk, Martha) (Entered: 11/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 11/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION by Robert N. Kaplan re 106 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion to Appoint The Miller Law Firm, P.C. as Liaison Counsel and Kaplan Fox as Co-Lead Counsel filed by Chi-Mar Enterprises, Incorporated (Olijnyk, Martha) (Entered: 11/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 11/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion to Appoint The Miller Law Firm, P.C. as Liaison Counsel and Kaplan Fox as Co-Lead Counsel by Chi-Mar Enterprises, Incorporated. (Olijnyk, Martha) (Entered: 11/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 11/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM re 86 Order by Mazel LLC(08-11315), Mazel LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Quinn Emanuel Trial Lawyers Firm Resume, # 2 Exhibit B - Quinn Emanuel Trial Lawyers Resumes) (Olijnyk, Martha) (Entered: 11/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF