Yary et al v. Voigt
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:11-cv-00694
District Judge Joan N. Ericksen, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Irving Braverman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kelley, Wolter & Scott, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel M Scott +1 612 371 9090 +1 612 371 0574 dscott@kelleywolter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robins, Kaplan, Miller & Ciresi LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin M Magnuson +1 612 349 8242 +1 612 339 4181 kmmagnuson@rkmc.com
No Logo Kenneth D. Resnick, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kelley, Wolter & Scott, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel M Scott +1 612 371 9090 +1 612 371 0574 dscott@kelleywolter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robins, Kaplan, Miller & Ciresi LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin M Magnuson +1 612 349 8242 +1 612 339 4181 kmmagnuson@rkmc.com
No Logo Marion L. Resnick, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kelley, Wolter & Scott, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel M Scott +1 612 371 9090 +1 612 371 0574 dscott@kelleywolter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robins, Kaplan, Miller & Ciresi LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin M Magnuson +1 612 349 8242 +1 612 339 4181 kmmagnuson@rkmc.com
No Logo Ron Yary, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kelley, Wolter & Scott, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel M Scott +1 612 371 9090 +1 612 371 0574 dscott@kelleywolter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robins, Kaplan, Miller & Ciresi LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin M Magnuson +1 612 349 8242 +1 612 339 4181 kmmagnuson@rkmc.com
v.
No Logo Stuart A. Voigt, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lommen, Abdo, Cole, King & Stageberg, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip A Cole +1 612 339 8131 +1 612 339 8064 phil@lommen.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan R Feldhaus +1 612 339 8131 +1 612 339 8064 bryan@lommen.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a)
Nature of Suit 370 - Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: (Pretrial Conference set for 1/24/2012 09:45 AM in Judge's Chambers 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel). Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 12/28/11. (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form)(akl) (Entered: 12/28/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 15 Filed: 12/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER : IT IS ORDERED THAT:1.Voigts Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Amended Complaint [Docket No. 6] is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART.2.Counts I, II, and IV are dismissed in part.(Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on December 27, 2011. (slf) (Entered: 12/27/2011)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joan N. Ericksen: Motion Hearing held on 7/7/2011 re 6 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by Stuart A. Voigt. Motion was argued and taken under advisement. (Court Reporter Maria Weinbeck) (slf) (Entered: 07/08/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/23/2011, Entered: None
        REPLY to Response to Motion re 6 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by Stuart A. Voigt. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Feldhaus, Bryan) (Entered: 06/23/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: None
          MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 6 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by Irving Braverman, Kenneth D. Resnick, Marion L. Resnick, Ron Yary. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate, # 2 ECF Form Declaration of Technical Issues)(Magnuson, Kevin) (Entered: 06/17/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/26/2011, Entered: None
            AFFIDAVIT of Stuart A. Voigt in SUPPORT OF 6 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by Stuart A. Voigt. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A-C)(Feldhaus, Bryan) (Entered: 05/26/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/25/2011, Entered: None
              AFFIDAVIT of Bryan R. Feldhaus in SUPPORT OF 6 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by Stuart A. Voigt. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) D)(Feldhaus, Bryan) (Entered: 05/25/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/25/2011, Entered: None
                DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR, WILL RE-FILE. AFFIDAVIT of Stuart A. Voigt in SUPPORT OF 6 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by Stuart A. Voigt. Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A-C)(Feldhaus, Bryan) Modified on 5/26/2011 (JME). Modified on 5/26/2011 (Ellingson, Jackie). (Entered: 05/25/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 8 Filed: 5/25/2011, Entered: None
                  MEMORANDUM in Support re 6 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by Stuart A. Voigt. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Feldhaus, Bryan) (Entered: 05/25/2011)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                    NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 6 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint: Motion Hearing set for 7/7/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 12W (MPLS) before Judge Joan N. Ericksen. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service).(Feldhaus, Bryan) Modified text on 4/25/2011 (MMP). (Entered: 04/22/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/22/2011, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                      MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by Stuart A. Voigt. (Feldhaus, Bryan) (Entered: 04/22/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/1/2011, Entered: None
                        ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed of Amended Summons and Amended Complaint Acknowledgement filed by Stuart A. Voigt. (Feldhaus, Bryan) (Entered: 04/01/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/1/2011, Entered: None
                          NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan R Feldhaus on behalf of Stuart A. Voigt. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Feldhaus, Bryan) (Entered: 04/01/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/29/2011, Entered: None
                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Irving Braverman, Ron Yary, Kenneth D. Resnick, Marion L. Resnick. Stuart A. Voigt served on 3/25/2011, answer due 4/15/2011. (Scott, Daniel) (Entered: 03/29/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: None
                              AMENDED COMPLAINT against Stuart A. Voigt, filed by Irving Braverman, Ron Yary, Kenneth D. Resnick, Marion L. Rescick. (Magnuson, Kevin) (Entered: 03/23/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank 1 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                COMPLAINT against Stuart A. Voigt ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 4053130.) assigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen per Securities list and referred to Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel, filed by Irving Braverman, Ron Yary, Kenneth D. Resnick, Marion L. Resnick. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (RLR) (Entered: 03/22/2011)
                                  LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 150 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?