Security Life Insurance Company of America v. Southwest Reinsure, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:11-cv-01358-MJD-SER
District Judge Michael J. Davis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.

Reality Check: Credit Acceptance Corporation, Part I

This docket is featured in the December 13, 2017 article Reality Check: Credit Acceptance Corporation, Part I.

Last Updated October 15, 2017 at 2:15 AM DT (3.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Security Life Insurance Company Of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Best & Flanagan LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sarah E. Crippen +1 612 339 7121 +1 612 339 5897 scrippen@bestlaw.com
Space Daniel L Grimsrud +1 612 339 7121 +1 612 339 5897 dgrimsrud@bestlaw.com
Space Robert L Meller, Jr. +1 612 339 7121 +1 612 339 5897 rmeller@bestlaw.com
v.
No Logo Abc Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Family Heritage Reinsurance Co., Ltd., Defendant
No Logo Ideal Insurance Company, Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hellmuth & Johnson, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Terrance W Moore +1 952 746 2175 +1 952 941 2337 tmoore@hjlawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David M Schlecker +1 212 521 5400 dschlecker@reedsmith.com
Space Paul Walker-Bright +1 312 207 1000 pwalkerbright@reedsmith.com
No Logo INA Trust FSB, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Meagher & Geer, PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Erin Devlin Doran +1 612 337 9679 edoran@meagher.com
Space Laura Jean Hanson +1 612 347 9192 +1 612 338 0661 lhanson@meagher.com

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daryn E. Rush +1 215 864 6360 +1 215 864 6336 rushd@whiteandwilliams.com
No Logo Smith, James Bradford, Defendant
Officially listed as "James B. Smith"

Toggle Switch Represented by Hellmuth & Johnson, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Terrance W Moore +1 952 746 2175 +1 952 941 2337 tmoore@hjlawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David M Schlecker +1 212 521 5400 dschlecker@reedsmith.com
Space Paul Walker-Bright +1 312 207 1000 pwalkerbright@reedsmith.com
No Logo Jane Does 1-10, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOES 1-10, Defendant
No Logo Libre Insurance Co., Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fredrikson & Byron, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory E Karpenko +1 612 492 7000 +1 612 492 7077 gkarpenko@fredlaw.com
Space David Gray Waytz +1 612 492 7077 dwaytz@fredlaw.com
No Logo Sierra Family Life Reinsurance Co., Ltd., Defendant
No Logo Southwest Reinsure, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hellmuth & Johnson, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Terrance W Moore +1 952 746 2175 +1 952 941 2337 tmoore@hjlawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP (IL-NA)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David M Schlecker +1 212 521 5400 dschlecker@reedsmith.com
Space Paul Walker-Bright +1 312 207 1000 pwalkerbright@reedsmith.com
No Logo Xyz Corporation, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 110 - Contract - Insurance
Office DMN
Filed 5/26/2011
Jury Demand Both
Demand $75000
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Judgment - Other
County Hennepin
Terminated 10/19/2016
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags CLOSED,CV,PHV,PROTO,STAYED
  Entries (120) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 10/21/2016, Entered: 10/21/2016 Judgment
JUDGMENT (Attachments: # (1) Civil Notice - appeal)(KNK)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: 10/20/2016 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
    ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 10/19/16. (KMW)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: 10/18/2016 Stipulation of Dismissal
      STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Security Life Insurance Company of America. Jointly Signed by Southwest Reinsure, Inc., James B. Smith, Ideal Insurance Company, Ltd., Libre Insurance Company, Ltd., Dennis McNally, and INA Trust FSB. (Crippen, Sarah)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: 9/19/2016 Stipulation of Dismissal
        STIPULATION of Dismissal of Remaining Claims with Prejudice by Security Life Insurance Company of America. Jointly Signed by INA Trust FSB. (Crippen, Sarah)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 112 Filed: 3/23/2016, Entered: 3/23/2016 Notice to Attorney - JJK Case ReassignedCourt Filing
          TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Due to the retirement of Magistrate Judge Keyes, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes no longer assigned to the case.NOTE: the new case number is 11-cv-1358 MJD/SER. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. (kt)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: 8/28/2015 Notice of Withdrawal as Attorney
            NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney Without Substitution (Sullivan, John)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: 8/3/2015 Notice of Change of Address
              NOTICE of Change of Address by John T Sullivan (Sullivan, John)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: 5/12/2015 Judgment
                JUDGMENT (Attachments: # (1) Civil Notice - appeal)(lmb)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document 108 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: 5/12/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER. IT IS ORDERED: 1. That the Stipulated Motion to Confirm Arbitration Awards is GRANTED [106]. 2. The parties are to bear their own costs. 3. Any party that seeks to enforce judgment against another party in any court is relieved of all obligations to keep confidential the Interim Final Arbitration Award dated December 13, 2014, and the Second Interim Final Arbitration Award dated January 28, 2015, and may publicly file either award when seeking to enforce judgment. LET JUDGMENT BE ENTERED ACCORDINGLY. (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 5/11/15. (GRR)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: 4/13/2015 Affidavit of Service
                    AFFIDAVIT of Service by Security Life Insurance Company of America re [106] Stipulation,, Proposed Order, Exhibits Filed Under Seal (Crippen, Sarah)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document 106 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: 4/10/2015 Stipulation
                      STIPULATION Stipulated Motion for Order Confirming Arbitration Awards by Security Life Insurance Company of America. Jointly Signed by Southwest Reinsure, Inc., James B. Smith, Ideal Insurance Company, Ltd., and Libre Insurance Company, Ltd.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) Exhibit A - Confidentiality Agreement, # (2) Placeholder for Exhibit B - Interim Final Arbitration Award, # (3) Placeholder for Exhibit C - Second Interim Final Arbitration Award, # (4) Placeholder for Exhibit D - Correspondence in which the Arbitration Panel confirmed that the Arbitration Awards are final is attached to this Stipulated Motion under seal)(Crippen, Sarah) DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE 4/10/15. Modified on 4/13/2015 (JAM).
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 4/18/2013, Entered: 4/18/2013 Notice of Withdrawal as Attorney
                      NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney and Substitution of Counsel (Waytz, David)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 4/18/2013, Entered: 4/18/2013 Notice of Withdrawal as Attorney
                        NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney for Plaintiff (Borer, Elizabeth)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank 103 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: 2/11/2013 Order on Motion to Dismiss/GeneralCourt Filing
                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW & ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. Defendant Libre Insurance Co.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, or in the Alternative, Stay Pending Arbitration, or in the Further Alternative, Extend Time to Answer and for Discovery [75] is GRANTED as follows: the claims against Libre are STAYED pending arbitration of those claims. 2. Defendants Southwest Reinsure, Inc.'s, Ideal Insurance Company, Ltd.'s and James B. Smith's Joinder to Defendant Libre Insurance Co.'s Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Stay Pending Arbitration, or in the Further Alternative, Extend Time to Answer and for Discovery [80] is GRANTED as follows: the claims against Southwest Reinsure, Inc., Ideal Insurance Company, Ltd., and James B. Smith are STAYED pending arbitration of those claims. 3. Defendant INA Trust FSB's Motion Joining, in Part, to Libre Insurance Company's Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Stay Pending Arbitration, or in the Further Alternative, Extend Time to Answer and for Discovery [86] is GRANTED as follows: the claims against INA Trust FSB are STAYED pending the completion of the arbitration between Security Life and Libre Insurance Co Southwest Reinsure, Inc., Ideal Insurance Company, Ltd., and James B. Smith. (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 2/11/13. (GRR)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 1/30/2013, Entered: 1/30/2013 Notice of Change of Address
                            NOTICE of Change of Address by Erin D Doran (Doran, Erin)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: 10/5/2012 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis: Motion Hearing held on 10/5/2012 re [75] MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint, or in the Alternative, Stay Pending Arbitration, or in the further Alternative, Extend Time to Answer and for Discovery filed by Libre Insurance Co., Ltd., [86] MOTION to Stay filed by INA Trust FSB, [80] MOTION for Joinder to Libre Insurance Co.'s Motion to Dismiss filed by Southwest Reinsure, Inc., James B. Smith, Ideal Insurance Company, Ltd. Motions were moved, argued and taken under advisement. Order to follow. (Court Reporter Lori Simpson) (KMW)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: 9/28/2012 Notice to AttorneyCourt Filing
                                NOTICE to Attorneys: The hearing on the Motions to Dismiss [75] [80] and Motion to Stay [86] scheduled for Friday, October 5, 2012 before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis has been rescheduled (time change only). The hearing has been rescheduled for Friday, October 5, 2012, 2012 at 8:30 a.m. in Courtroom 15E of the Minneapolis Federal Courthouse. (KMW)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 8/29/2012, Entered: 8/29/2012 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER (See text of Order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 08/29/2012. (jz)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 8/16/2012, Entered: 8/16/2012 Reply
                                    REPLY re [97] Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by INA Trust FSB. (Attachments: # (1) LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Doran, Erin) Modified filer on 8/16/2012 (jz).
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 8/9/2012, Entered: 8/9/2012 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                      MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [86] MOTION to Stay filed by Security Life Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: # (1) LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Sullivan, John)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 7/26/2012, Entered: 7/26/2012 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER that: 1. An informal telephone conference to address discovery and scheduling matters with the Magistrate Judge is scheduled for 3 p.m. August 27, 2012. 2. Plaintiff's counsel shall arrange for and initiate the telephone conference. 3. The parties may submit short letters, with or without a limited number of documents attached, to set forth their respective positions on the discovery and scheduling matters. Any such submissions may be e-mailed to the chambers of the Magistrate Judge and must be received no later than 12 p.m. August 24, 2012. 4. The expert disclosure schedule set by the Pretrial Scheduling Order (Doc. No. 45) is suspended pending the August 27, 2012, conference with the Magistrate Judge. 5. The parties have not waived any right to arbitration or waived any argument against arbitration or against a stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 7/25/12. (jam)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: 7/24/2012 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                          AFFIDAVIT of Erin Doran in SUPPORT OF [86] MOTION to Stay filed by INA Trust FSB. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) Exhibits 1-4 to Erin Dorans Affidavit in Support of Motion to Stay)(Doran, Erin)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: 7/24/2012 Certificate of Service on Proposed Order
                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Security Life Insurance Company of America re [91] Stipulation, Relating to Discovery and Scheduling Matters (Sullivan, John)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: 7/23/2012 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                              AFFIDAVIT of Paul Walker-Bright in SUPPORT OF [80] MOTION for Joinder to Libre Insurance Co.'s Motion to Dismiss filed by Ideal Insurance Company, Ltd., James B. Smith, Southwest Reinsure, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) A-H)(Walker-Bright, Paul)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: 7/20/2012 Reply
                                                REPLY re [80] MOTION for Joinder to Libre Insurance Co.'s Motion to Dismiss filed by Ideal Insurance Company, Ltd., James B. Smith, Southwest Reinsure, Inc.. (Attachments: EXHIBIT FILED IN ERROR - WILL RE-FILE # (1) Exhibit(s), # (2) LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Walker-Bright, Paul) Modified on 7/23/2012 (jam).
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: 7/20/2012 Stipulation
                                                  STIPULATION re [67] Order Relating to Discovery and Scheduling Matters by INA Trust FSB, Ideal Insurance Company, Ltd., Libre Insurance Co., Ltd., Security Life Insurance Company of America, James B. Smith, Southwest Reinsure, Inc.. (Sullivan, John)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: 7/20/2012 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re [75] MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint, or in the Alternative, Stay Pending Arbitration, or in the further Alternative, Extend Time to Answer and for Discovery filed by Libre Insurance Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: # (1) LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Waytz, David)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: 7/18/2012 Certificate of Service on Proposed Order
                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by INA Trust FSB re [86] MOTION to Stay (Doran, Erin)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: 7/18/2012 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re [86] MOTION to Stay filed by INA Trust FSB. (Attachments: # (1) LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Doran, Erin)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: 7/18/2012 Notice of Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                          NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION [86] MOTION to Stay : Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 15E (MPLS) before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis. (Doran, Erin)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: 7/18/2012, Terminated: 2/11/2013 Motion to Stay
                                                            MOTION to Stay by INA Trust FSB. (Doran, Erin)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: 7/13/2012 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                              AFFIDAVIT of John T. Sullivan in OPPOSITION TO [75] MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint, or in the Alternative, Stay Pending Arbitration, or in the further Alternative, Extend Time to Answer and for Discovery, [80] MOTION for Joinder to Libre Insurance Co.'s Motion to Dismiss filed by Security Life Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) Exhibits A-M)(Sullivan, John)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: 7/13/2012 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [75] MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint, or in the Alternative, Stay Pending Arbitration, or in the further Alternative, Extend Time to Answer and for Discovery, [80] MOTION for Joinder to Libre Insurance Co.'s Motion to Dismiss filed by Security Life Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: # (1) LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Sullivan, John)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Blank 83 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: 6/29/2012 Notice to AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                  *TEXT ONLY ENTRY* NOTICE to Attorneys: Counsel are hereby notified that the matter previously scheduled for 7/26/2012, at 9:30 AM, will now be held before Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron in Courtroom 6B in St. Paul. Counsel are directed to contact the chambers of Magistrate Judge Mayeron to confirm the date, time and place that the matter will be heard. Please contact Katie Haagenson, Judicial Assistant, at 651-844-1190. This case continues to be one that is assigned to Magistrate Judge Keyes. Future non-dispositive and referred dispositive motions shall continue to be scheduled by contacting the chambers of Magistrate Judge Keyes. Counsel shall continue to supply courtesy copies of motions and supportive documents with chambers in accordance with Magistrate Judge Keyes' published preferences. (JEP) Modified on 7/2/2012 (jam).
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 6/25/2012, Entered: 6/25/2012 Notice of Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                    NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION [80] MOTION for Joinder to Libre Insurance Co.'s Motion to Dismiss : Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 15E (MPLS) before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis. (Walker-Bright, Paul)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: 6/22/2012 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re [80] MOTION for Joinder to Libre Insurance Co.'s Motion to Dismiss filed by Ideal Insurance Company, Ltd., James B. Smith, Southwest Reinsure, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Walker-Bright, Paul)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: 6/22/2012, Terminated: 2/11/2013 Motion for Joinder
                                                                        MOTION for Joinder to Libre Insurance Co.'s Motion to Dismiss by Ideal Insurance Company, Ltd., James B. Smith, Southwest Reinsure, Inc.. (Walker-Bright, Paul)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: 6/22/2012 Certificate of Service on Proposed Order
                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Libre Insurance Co., Ltd. re [75] MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint, or in the Alternative, Stay Pending Arbitration, or in the further Alternative, Extend Time to Answer and for Discovery (Waytz, David)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: 6/22/2012 Declaration in Support
                                                                            Declaration of David L. Lillehaug in Support of [75] MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint, or in the Alternative, Stay Pending Arbitration, or in the further Alternative, Extend Time to Answer and for Discovery filed by Libre Insurance Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) A)(Waytz, David)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: 6/22/2012 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re [75] MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint, or in the Alternative, Stay Pending Arbitration, or in the further Alternative, Extend Time to Answer and for Discovery filed by Libre Insurance Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: # (1) LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Waytz, David)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: 6/22/2012 Notice of Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION [75] MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint, or in the Alternative, Stay Pending Arbitration, or in the further Alternative, Extend Time to Answer and for Discovery : Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 15E (MPLS) before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis. (Waytz, David)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: 6/22/2012, Terminated: 2/11/2013 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint, or in the Alternative, Stay Pending Arbitration, or in the further Alternative, Extend Time to Answer and for Discovery by Libre Insurance Co., Ltd.. (Waytz, David)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 74 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: 6/8/2012 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER that within ten (10) days of this Order Defendant James B. Smith must pay Plaintiff Security Life Insurance Company of America, as a sanction for the violation of this Court's order, the sum of $3,000.00 for Plaintiff Security Life Insurance Company of America's costs, including attorney's fees and other expenses, in connection with this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 6/8/12. (kt)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: 6/8/2012 Settlement ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes: Settlement Conference held on 6/8/2012. No Settlement reached. (jz)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: 5/16/2012 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                        ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER: Pursuant to the stipulation (Doc. No. [70]) of the parties, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the time in which Defendant Libre Insurance Co., Ltd. may answer, move, plead, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Amended Complaint is extended through and including June 22, 2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 05/15/2012. (MMP)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 5/15/2012, Entered: 5/15/2012 Certificate of Service on Proposed Order
                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Libre Insurance Co., Ltd. re [70] Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant Libre Insurance Co., Ltd. to Answer Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Waytz, David)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/15/2012, Entered: 5/15/2012 Stipulation
                                                                                            STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant Libre Insurance Co., Ltd. to Answer Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Libre Insurance Co., Ltd., Security Life Insurance Company of America. (Waytz, David)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 5/15/2012, Entered: 5/15/2012 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by David Waytz on behalf of Libre Insurance Co., Ltd.. (Waytz, David)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: 4/27/2012 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                Answer and Affirmative Defenses ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Ideal Insurance Company, Ltd., James B. Smith, Southwest Reinsure, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) Answer to Amended Complaint Exhibit A) (Walker-Bright, Paul)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: 4/24/2012 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER re [65] Stipulation to Extension of Discovery Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 04/24/2012. (lmb)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: 4/24/2012 Certificate of Service on Proposed Order
                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Security Life Insurance Company of America re [65] Stipulation to Extension of Discovery Deadlines (Crippen, Sarah)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: 4/24/2012 Stipulation
                                                                                                      STIPULATION re [45] Scheduling Order, Extension of Discovery Deadlines by INA Trust FSB, Ideal Insurance Company, Ltd., Security Life Insurance Company of America, James B. Smith, Southwest Reinsure, Inc.. (Crippen, Sarah)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/20/2012, Entered: 4/20/2012 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 6/8/2012 09:30 AM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 646 (STP) before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 04/20/2012. (MMP)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/18/2012, Entered: 4/18/2012 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS SOUTHWEST REINSURE, INC., JAMES B. SMITH AND IDEAL INSURANCE COMPANY, LTD. TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT: that the time for Defendants Southwest Reinsure, Inc., James B. Smith and Ideal Insurance Company, Ltd. to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is extended through and including April 27, 2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 04/18/2012. (MMP)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/17/2012, Entered: 4/17/2012 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                            ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by INA Trust FSB. (Doran, Erin)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/17/2012, Entered: 4/17/2012 Stipulation
                                                                                                              STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendants Southwest Reinsure, James Smith and Ideal Insurance to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Ideal Insurance Company, Ltd., Security Life Insurance Company of America, James B. Smith, Southwest Reinsure, Inc.. (Walker-Bright, Paul)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Blank  Amended Summons Issued
                                                                                                                Amended Summons Issued as to Libre Insurance Co., Ltd.. (kt)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 60 Filed: 4/4/2012, Entered: 4/4/2012 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT -Jury Trial Demanded against All Defendants, filed by Security Life Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit(s) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit(s) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit(s) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit(s) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit(s) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit(s) Exhibit G) (Crippen, Sarah)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/3/2012, Entered: 4/3/2012 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER ON STIPULATION TO SERVICE AND FILING OF AMENDED COMPLAINT AND EXTENSION OF PUNITIVE DAMAGES MOTION DEADLINE: 1. Security Life may serve and file an Amended Complaint in the form attached as Exhibit A to the Stipulation to Service and Filing of Amended Complaint and Extension of Punitive Damages Motion Deadline (Doc. No. [57]). 2. The stipulation of Southwest Reinsure, Inc., Ideal Insurance Company, Ltd., James B. Smith, and INA Trust, FSB, to the service and filing of an Amended Complaint is without prejudice to Defendants right to answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint and to assert all defenses available to them to the Amended Complaint. 3. The deadline for filing a motion to amend the complaint to seek punitive damages is extended to May 31, 2012. 4. The stipulation of Southwest Reinsure, Inc., Ideal Insurance Company, Ltd., James B. Smith, and INA Trust, FSB, to this extension is without prejudice to Defendants' right to oppose a motion to amend to add punitive damages, if and when such motion is filed by Security Life. 5. All other deadlines set in the Court's Pretrial Scheduling Order (Doc. No. [45]), remain unchanged. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 04/03/2012. (MMP)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: 4/2/2012 Certificate of Service on Proposed Order
                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Security Life Insurance Company of America re [57] Stipulation, to Service and Filing of Amended Complaint and Extension of Punitive Damages Motion Deadline (Crippen, Sarah)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: 4/2/2012 Stipulation
                                                                                                                      STIPULATION to Service and Filing of Amended Complaint and Extension of Punitive Damages Motion Deadline by INA Trust FSB, Ideal Insurance Company, Ltd., Security Life Insurance Company of America, Sierra Family Life Reinsurance Co., Ltd., James B. Smith. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit(s) Exhibit B)(Crippen, Sarah)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/21/2012, Entered: 3/21/2012 Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        PROTECTIVE ORDER: Plaintiff Security Life Insurance Company of America and Defendants Southwest Reinsure, Inc., Ideal Insurance Company, Ltd., James B. Smith, and INA Trust, FSB, through their counsel have entered into a Stipulation for Protective Order (Doc. No. [54]). Pursuant to that Stipulation and Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(c), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 03/20/2012. (MMP)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/20/2012, Entered: 3/20/2012 Certificate of Service on Proposed Order
                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Security Life Insurance Company of America re [54] Stipulation FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER (Crippen, Sarah)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/20/2012, Entered: 3/20/2012 Stipulation
                                                                                                                            STIPULATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER by INA Trust FSB, Ideal Insurance Company, Ltd., Security Life Insurance Company of America, James B. Smith, Southwest Reinsure, Inc.. (Crippen, Sarah)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/17/2012, Entered: 1/17/2012 Answer to Complaint
                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by INA Trust FSB. (Doran, Erin)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/4/2012, Entered: 1/4/2012 Amended Answer to Complaint
                                                                                                                                AMENDED ANSWER with Jury Demand to by Ideal Insurance Company, Ltd., James B. Smith, Southwest Reinsure, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) Defendants' Amended Answer to Complaint - Exhibit A)(Walker-Bright, Paul)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/30/2011, Entered: 12/30/2011 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER: Defendant INA Trust FSB shall have through and including January 17, 2012, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. (INA Trust FSB answer due 1/17/2012). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 12/30/2011. (lmb)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/28/2011, Entered: 12/28/2011 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION to Extend the Time for Defendant INA Trust FSB to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by INA Trust FSB., and Security Life Insurance Company of America. (Hanson, Laura) Modified text on 12/28/2011 (MMP).
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 48 Filed: 12/20/2011, Entered: 12/20/2011 Order on Motion to Dismiss/GeneralCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW & ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1) Defendant INATrust, fsb's Motion to Dismiss [16] is DENIED. 2) Defendants Southwest Reinsure, Inc., Ideal Insurance Company, and James B. Smith's Motion to Dismiss [33] is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as follows: Counts III (breach of the Reinsurance Agreements), VI (breach of fiduciary duty), and VIII (fraud) REMAIN, Count IX (conversion) is DISMISSED with prejudice, and Count XII (mandatory injunction) is DISMISSED without prejudice. (Written Opinion). Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 12/20/11. (GRR)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: 10/7/2011 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis: Motion Hearing held on 10/7/2011 re [16] MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint filed by INA Trust FSB, [33] Amended MOTION to Dismiss/General Counts III, VI, VIII, IX and XII of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Southwest Reinsure, Inc., James B. Smith, Ideal Insurance Company, Ltd. Motions to Dismiss were moved, argued and taken under advisement. Orders to follow. (Court Reporter Lori Simpson) (KMW)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: 9/28/2011 Notice to AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE to Attorneys: The hearing on the Motions for Dismiss [16] [33] scheduled for Friday, October 7,2011 at 9:00 a.m. in the Minneapolis Federal Courthouse shall be heard at 8:30a.m. on October 7, 2011 before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis. (KMW)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: 9/13/2011 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 3/31/2012. Discovery due by 5/31/2012. Motions (non-disp) due 5/31/2012. Motions (disp) due by 3/1/2013. Ready for trial due by 7/1/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 08/30/2011. (MMP)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: 8/31/2011 Reply
                                                                                                                                              REPLY re [16] MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint filed by INA Trust FSB. (Attachments: # (1) LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Doran, Erin)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: 8/31/2011 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate
                                                                                                                                                LR7.1 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Ideal Insurance Company, Ltd., James B. Smith, Southwest Reinsure, Inc. re [42] Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Ideal Insurance Company, Ltd., James B. Smith, Southwest Reinsure, Inc.. (Walker-Bright, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: 8/31/2011 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re [33] Amended MOTION to Dismiss/General Counts III, VI, VIII, IX and XII of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Ideal Insurance Company, Ltd., James B. Smith, Southwest Reinsure, Inc.. (Walker-Bright, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/24/2011, Entered: 8/24/2011 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Daniel R. Bauer in OPPOSITION TO [33] Amended MOTION to Dismiss/General Counts III, VI, VIII, IX and XII of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Security Life Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) 1 - 5)(Crippen, Sarah)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/24/2011, Entered: 8/24/2011 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [33] Amended MOTION to Dismiss/General Counts III, VI, VIII, IX and XII of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Security Life Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: # (1) LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Crippen, Sarah)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/24/2011, Entered: 8/24/2011 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Elizabeth C. Borer in OPPOSITION TO [16] MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Security Life Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) A - L)(Crippen, Sarah)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/24/2011, Entered: 8/24/2011 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [16] MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Security Life Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: # (1) LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Crippen, Sarah)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: 12/21/2011 Pretrial Conference - InitialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry: Pretrial Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 8/22/2011. Pretrial Scheduling Order to be issued. (MMP)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: 8/17/2011 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
                                                                                                                                                              REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by INA Trust FSB, Ideal Insurance Company, Ltd., Security Life Insurance Company of America, James B. Smith, Southwest Reinsure, Inc..(Borer, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/20/2011, Entered: 7/20/2011 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER MODIFYING THE BRIEFING SCHEDULE re [35] Stipulation filed by INA Trust FSB, Southwest Reinsure, Inc., James B. Smith, Ideal Insurance Company, Ltd., and Security Life Insurance Company of America. Signed by Chief Judge Michael J. Davis on 7/20/11. (KMW)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/20/2011, Entered: 7/20/2011 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION to Modify Briefing Schedule by INA Trust FSB, Ideal Insurance Company, Ltd., James B. Smith, Southwest Reinsure, Inc., Security Life Insurance Company of America. (Borer, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: 7/15/2011 Amended Notice of HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: [33] Amended MOTION to Dismiss/General Counts III, VI, VIII, IX and XII of Plaintiff's Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 10/7/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 15E (MPLS) before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis. (Walker-Bright, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: 7/15/2011, Terminated: 12/20/2011 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                      Amended MOTION to Dismiss/General Counts III, VI, VIII, IX and XII of Plaintiff's Complaint by Ideal Insurance Company, Ltd., James B. Smith, Southwest Reinsure, Inc.. (Walker-Bright, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: 7/15/2011 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                        RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Plaintiff Security Life Insurance Company of America states that its parent company is Security American Financial Enterprises, Inc., a Minnesota corporation. No publicly held corporation owns 10% or more of Security American Financial Enterprises, Inc.s stock. (Borer, Elizabeth) Modified text on 7/15/2011 (lmb).
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: 7/15/2011 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                          RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant INA Trust FSB. (Doran, Erin)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: 7/15/2011 Amended Notice of HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: [16] MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 10/7/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 15E (MPLS) before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis. (Doran, Erin)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 29 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: 7/15/2011 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                              RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. The parent company of Defendant Southwest Reinsure, Inc. is SouthwestRe, Inc., a New Mexico holding corporation. No publicly held corporation owns 10% or more of Southwest Reinsure, Inc.'s stock. The parent company of Defendant Ideal Insurance Company, Ltd. is SouthwestRe, Inc., a New Mexico holding corporation. No publicly held corporation owns 10% or more of Ideal Insurance Company, Ltd.'s stock. (Walker-Bright, Paul) Modified text on 7/15/2011 (lmb).
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: 7/15/2011 [inactive motion]
                                                                                                                                                                                LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate re [27] Memorandum, filed by Southwest Reinsure, Inc., James B. Smith, Ideal Insurance Company, Ltd. (Walker-Bright, Paul) Modified text and link on 7/15/2011 (lmb).
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: 7/15/2011 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re [26] MOTION to Dismiss/General Counts III, VI, VIII, IX and XII of Complaint filed by Southwest Reinsure, Inc.. (Walker-Bright, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: 7/15/2011, Terminated: 7/15/2011 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                    ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-DOES NOT COMPLY WITH ECF RULES FOR FILING*** MOTION to Dismiss/General by Southwest Reinsure, Inc. (Walker-Bright, Paul) Modified text on 7/15/2011 (lmb).
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 25 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: 7/15/2011 Answer to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint by Southwest Reinsure, Inc., James B. Smith, Ideal Insurance Company, Ltd. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) A). (Walker-Bright, Paul) Modified text and filers on 7/15/2011 (lmb).
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: 7/14/2011 Notice of HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 8/22/2011 09:45 AM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes. (Attachments: # (1) Consent Form)(MMP)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: 7/14/2011 Amended Notice of HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: [16] MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 10/7/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 15E (MPLS) before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis. (Doran, Erin)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: 7/13/2011 Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. [16] Motion, [17] Notice of Hearing on Motion [18] Memorandum, [19] Affidavit, [20] Affidavit [21] Declaration filed by INA Trust FSB (Doran, Erin) Modified text on 7/13/2011 (MMP).
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: 7/13/2011 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Daryn E. Rush in Support of [16] MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint filed by INA Trust FSB. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) 1, # (2) Exhibit(s) 2). (Doran, Erin) Modified text on 7/13/2011 (lmb).
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: 7/13/2011 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Lisa Pierro in SUPPORT OF [16] MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint filed by INA Trust FSB. (Doran, Erin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: 7/13/2011 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Deborah Giss Stalker in SUPPORT OF [16] MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint filed by INA Trust FSB. (Doran, Erin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: 7/13/2011 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re [16] MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint filed by INA Trust FSB. (Attachments: # (1) LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Doran, Erin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: 7/13/2011 Notice of Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION [16] MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 10/7/2011 09:30 AM in Courtroom 15E (MPLS) before Chief Judge Michael J. Davis. (Doran, Erin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: 7/13/2011, Terminated: 12/20/2011 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint by INA Trust FSB. (Doran, Erin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: 7/13/2011 Trial Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                        EXHIBIT re [1] Complaint,, Exhibit G (Corrected) by Security Life Insurance Company of America. (Borer, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                          TEXT ONLY ENTRY - ORDER granting [13] Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorney Daryn E. Rush for INA Trust FSB. Fee paid; receipt number 3-008574. Approved by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 7/7/11. (MMC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: 7/6/2011 Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by INA Trust FSB re [13] MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Daryn E. Rush (Doran, Erin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: 7/5/2011, Terminated: 7/7/2011 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Daryn E. Rush by INA Trust FSB. (Doran, Erin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                TEXT ONLY ENTRY - ORDER granting [10],[11] Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorneys David M. Schlecker and Paul Walker-Bright for Ideal Insurance Company, Ltd., James B. Smith, Southwest Reinsure, Inc. Fees paid; receipt number 3-008519.Approved by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 6/23/11. (MMC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/22/2011, Entered: 6/22/2011 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT INA TRUST FSB TO RESPOND TOPLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT: The time for Defendant INA Trust FSB to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended through and including July 13, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 06/22/2011. (MMP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/22/2011, Entered: 6/22/2011, Terminated: 6/23/2011 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Paul Walker-Bright by Ideal Insurance Company, Ltd., James B. Smith, Southwest Reinsure, Inc.. (Moore, Terrance)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/22/2011, Entered: 6/22/2011, Terminated: 6/23/2011 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for David M. Schlecker by Ideal Insurance Company, Ltd., James B. Smith, Southwest Reinsure, Inc.. (Moore, Terrance)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: 6/21/2011 Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        document filed in error-CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ideal Insurance Company, Ltd., James B. Smith, Southwest Reinsure, Inc. re [8] Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond (Moore, Terrance) Modified text on 6/21/2011 (MMP).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: 6/21/2011, Terminated: 6/21/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR ALREADY RULED ON BY [6] ORDER -Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Ideal Insurance Company, Ltd., Security Life Insurance Company of America, James B. Smith, Southwest Reinsure, Inc. (Moore, Terrance) Modified TEXT on 6/21/2011 (mmp).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: 6/21/2011 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION to Extend the Time for Defendant INA Trust FSB to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by INA Trust FSB, Security Life Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service)(Hanson, Laura)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: 6/21/2011 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: Pursuant to Joint Motion To Extend time to file answer (Doc. No. [5]), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Southwest Reinsure, Inc., James B. Smith, and Ideal Insurance Company, Ltd., shall have through and including July 15, 2011, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff Security Life Insurance Company of America's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 06/21/2011. (MMP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/20/2011, Entered: 6/20/2011, Terminated: 6/21/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Ideal Insurance Company, Ltd., Security Life Insurance Company of America, James B. Smith, Southwest Reinsure, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service)(Moore, Terrance) Modified TEXT on 6/21/2011 (MMP). Notified attorney re: proposed order not be be filed on CM/ECF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/20/2011, Entered: 6/20/2011 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Terrance W Moore on behalf of Ideal Insurance Company, Ltd., James B. Smith, Southwest Reinsure, Inc.. (Moore, Terrance)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: 6/2/2011 Order of RecusalCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER OF DISQUALIFICATION. Judge Richard H. Kyle recused. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Michael J. Davis for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 11cv1358 MJD/JJK. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 6/2/2011. (JME)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/1/2011, Entered: 6/1/2011 Order of RecusalCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DISQUALIFICATION AND ORDER FOR REASSIGNMENT. Senior Judge David S. Doty recused. Case reassigned to Judge Richard H. Kyle for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 11cv1358 RHK/JJK. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 6/1/2011. (JME)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/26/2011, Entered: 5/26/2011 ComplaintCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against ABC Corporation, Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, Family Heritage Reinsurance Co., Ltd., INA Trust FSB, Ideal Insurance Company, Ltd., Libre Insurance Co., Ltd., Sierra Family Life Reinsurance Co., Ltd., James B. Smith, Southwest Reinsure, Inc., XYZ Corporation ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 4054644.) assigned to Judge David S. Doty per Master List referred to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes, filed by Security Life Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibits A through G, # (2) Civil Cover Sheet). (jz) Modified text on 5/26/2011 (lmb). DOCUMENTS QC'd by KT on 6/1/11. (KT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Summons Issued as to ABC Corporation, Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, Family Heritage Reinsurance Co., Ltd., INA Trust FSB, Ideal Insurance Company, Ltd., Libre Insurance Co., Ltd., Sierra Family Life Reinsurance Co., Ltd., James B. Smith, Southwest Reinsure, Inc., XYZ Corporation. (jz) Modified text on 5/26/2011 (lmb).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 192 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?