USA v. Gopher State Ethanol
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:02-cv-03793
District Judge Joan N. Ericksen, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cynthia Ann King +1 757 486 6040 +1 757 486 6041 attorneyking@earthlink.net
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Connie Puchalski
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas L. Sansonetti +1 202 514 2738
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dianne-NA M Shawley
No Logo Minnesota Pollution Control Agency, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by MN Supreme Court

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen L Winters +1 651 297 8756 +1 651 297 4139 kathleen.winters@state.mn.us
No Logo Minnesota, State of, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by MN Supreme Court

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen L Winters +1 651 297 8756 +1 651 297 4139 kathleen.winters@state.mn.us
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 7413(b)
Nature of Suit 893 - Environmental Matters
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 13 Filed: 7/7/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
Amended CONSENT DECREE. Signed by Judge Joan N Ericksen on 9/5/03. (VEM) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/11/2005 (SS). Modified on 3/11/2005 (SS). Modified on 3/11/2005 (SS). (Entered: 07/07/2004)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/5/2003, Entered: None
    INTERVENOR'S COMPLAINT by Minnesota, State of, MN Pollution Control ( 14 pgs) (MKC) (Entered: 09/09/2003)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/5/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER ( Judge Joan N. Ericksen / 9/5/03) that the State of Minnesota, and the MN Pollution Control [2-1] be granted leave to intervene in the action and to become a party plaintiff and to file the complaint in Intervention immediately upon entry of this order. (1 pg) (cc: all counsel) (MKC) (Entered: 09/09/2003)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/3/2003, Entered: None
        EXHIBITS by plaintiff to memorandum in support of motion to enter amended consent decree [9-1], [8-1] 4pg(s) + attachments (separate) (JMR) (Entered: 09/08/2003)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/3/2003, Entered: None
          MEMORANDUM by plaintiff in support of motion to enter amended consent decree [8-1] 35pg(s) (JMR) (Entered: 09/08/2003)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/3/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
            Unopposed MOTION by plaintiff to enter amended consent decree ( to Judge Joan N. Ericksen ) 2pg(s) (JMR) (Entered: 09/08/2003)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/22/2003, Entered: None
              NOTICE OF LODGING by plaintiff of Amended Consent Decree with the Clerk of Court - to be lodged on left-side of clerk's file. 5pg(s) (DFL) (Entered: 05/30/2003)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/14/2002, Entered: None
                LETTER to court from Sarah Birrenbach re: the Gopher State Ethanol facility located in St. Paul, MN. 5 pg(s) (VEM) (Entered: 11/25/2002)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/14/2002, Entered: None
                  LETTER to court from John Birrenbach re: the Gopher State Ethanol facility located in St. Paul, MN. 5 pg(s) (VEM) (Entered: 11/25/2002)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/16/2002, Entered: None
                    AFFIDAVIT of John Birrenbach pg(s) (DFL) (Entered: 10/29/2002)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/11/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER FOR REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES (Senior Judge David S. Doty) (Judge Joan E. Lancaster / 10/10/02) (Related cases 02-3783 JEL/RLE and 02-3794 JEL/RLE) This case reassigned to Judge Joan E. Lancaster per the master list , and Case referred to Magistrate Judge Raymond L. Erickson 2pg(s) (cc: all counsel) (JMR) (Entered: 10/23/2002)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/2/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                        MOTION and memorandum to intervene (was to Senior Judge David S. Doty-now to Judge Joan N. Ericksen) by Minnesota, State of, MN Pollution Control 28pg(s) (VEM) Modified on 07/29/2003 (Entered: 10/04/2002)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/2/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                          COMPLAINT - Summons not issued. Assigned to Senior Judge David S. Doty per Master list and referred to Magistrate Judge Susan R. Nelson. 18 pg(s) (VEM) (Entered: 10/04/2002)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 56 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?