Spectralytics, Inc. v. Cordis Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:05-cv-01464

Tags
Last Updated December 28, 2016 at 3:48 PM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Spectralytics, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Carlson, Caspers, Vandenburgh, Lindquist & Schuman, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dennis C Bremer +1 612 436 9614 +1 612 436 9605 dbremer@ccvl.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan G Carlson +1 612 436 9616 +1 612 436 9605 acarlson@ccvl.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Philip P Caspers +1 612 436 9600 +1 612 436 9605 pcaspers@carlsoncaspers.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew J. Goggin +1 612 436 9600 mgoggin@ccvl.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel A Hamer +1 612 436 9615 +1 612 436 9605 shamer@ccvl.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian W Hayes +1 612 436 9600 +1 612 436 9605 bhayes@ccvl.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Russell J Rigby +1 612 436 9600 +1 612 436 9605 rrigby@ccvl.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J Derek Vandenburgh +1 612 436 9600 +1 612 436 9605 dvandenburgh@carlsoncaspers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Dorsey & Whitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rabea Jamal Zayed +1 612 492 6711 +1 612 573 6650 zayed.rj@dorsey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Klarquist Sparkman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/14/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Deakin Thomas Lauer , +1 503 595 5300 +1 503 595 5301 deakin.lauer@klarquist.com
No Logo Cordis Corporation, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Anthony Ostlund Baer & Louwagie PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph W. Anthony +1 612 349 6969 +1 612 349 6996 janthony@aoblaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Courtland C Merrill +1 612 349 6969 +1 612 349 6996 cmerrill@anthonyostlund.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Johnson & Johnson, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/13/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William E Craco +1 732 524 1289 wcraco@corus.jnj.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Patterson, Belknap, Webb & Tyler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Irene Choi +1 212 336 2838
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen Marie Crotty +1 212 336 2924 +1 212 336 2222 kmcrotty@pbwt.com
TERMINATED: 08/30/2012, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jesse A Devine +1 212 336 2436 +1 212 336 1247 jdevine@pbwt.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory L. Diskant +1 212 336 2000 +1 212 336 2222 gdiskant@pbwt.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aron Fischer +1 212 336 2000 afischer@pbwt.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eugene M. Gelernter +1 212 336 2000 +1 973 297 3971 emgelernter@pbwt.com
TERMINATED: 08/26/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Owen Jackson, III +1 212 336 2767 +1 212 336 2222 rojackson@pbwt.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert W. Lehrburger +1 212 336 2000 +1 212 336 2222 rwlehrburger@pbwt.com
TERMINATED: 08/26/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anjan Mishra +1 212 336 2000 +1 212 336 2222 amishra@pbwt.com
TERMINATED: 06/13/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rosa E. Son +1 212 336 2388 +3367 336 336 7912
TERMINATED: 07/01/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael James Timmons +1 212 336 2000 +1 212 336 2222 mjtimmons@pbwt.com
v.
No Logo Cordis Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Anthony Ostlund Baer & Louwagie PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph W. Anthony +1 612 349 6969 +1 612 349 6996 janthony@aoblaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Courtland C Merrill +1 612 349 6969 +1 612 349 6996 cmerrill@anthonyostlund.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Carlson, Caspers, Vandenburgh, Lindquist & Schuman, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/25/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dennis C Bremer +1 612 436 9614 +1 612 436 9605 dbremer@ccvl.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Johnson & Johnson, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/13/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William E Craco +1 732 524 1289 wcraco@corus.jnj.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Jane Marie Metcalf

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/30/2012, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jesse A Devine +1 212 336 2436 +1 212 336 1247 jdevine@pbwt.com

Toggle Switch Represented by MASLON LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/21/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Z Pentelovitch +1 612 672 8200 +1 612 642 8338 bill.pentelovitch@maslon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Patterson, Belknap, Webb & Tyler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Irene Choi +1 212 336 2838
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen Marie Crotty +1 212 336 2924 +1 212 336 2222 kmcrotty@pbwt.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory L. Diskant +1 212 336 2000 +1 212 336 2222 gdiskant@pbwt.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aron Fischer +1 212 336 2000 afischer@pbwt.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eugene M. Gelernter +1 212 336 2000 +1 973 297 3971 emgelernter@pbwt.com
TERMINATED: 08/26/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Owen Jackson, III +1 212 336 2767 +1 212 336 2222 rojackson@pbwt.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert W. Lehrburger +1 212 336 2000 +1 212 336 2222 rwlehrburger@pbwt.com
TERMINATED: 08/26/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anjan Mishra +1 212 336 2000 +1 212 336 2222 amishra@pbwt.com
TERMINATED: 06/13/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rosa E. Son +1 212 336 2388 +3367 336 336 7912
TERMINATED: 07/01/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael James Timmons +1 212 336 2000 +1 212 336 2222 mjtimmons@pbwt.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul-NA A. Coletti

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul-NA A. Coletti
No Logo Norman Noble, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Anthony Ostlund Baer & Louwagie PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Courtland C Merrill +1 612 349 6969 +1 612 349 6996 cmerrill@anthonyostlund.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Carlson, Caspers, Vandenburgh, Lindquist & Schuman, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/25/2009, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dennis C Bremer +1 612 436 9614 +1 612 436 9605 dbremer@ccvl.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Edward Connelly +1 612 766 7000 +1 612 766 1600 jconnelly@faegre.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Frantz Ward LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julie R Fenstermaker +1 216 515 1644 jfenstermaker@frantzward.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher C. Koehler +1 216 515 1660 +1 216 515 1650 ckoehler@frantzward.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James B. Niehaus +1 216 515 1660 jniehaus@frantzward.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Universal Hospital Services, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lee M Pulju +1 952 893 3227 +1 952 893 3237 LMPulju@uhs.com
No Logo Spectralytics, Inc., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Carlson, Caspers, Vandenburgh, Lindquist & Schuman, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dennis C Bremer +1 612 436 9614 +1 612 436 9605 dbremer@ccvl.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan G Carlson +1 612 436 9616 +1 612 436 9605 acarlson@ccvl.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Philip P Caspers +1 612 436 9600 +1 612 436 9605 pcaspers@carlsoncaspers.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew J. Goggin +1 612 436 9600 mgoggin@ccvl.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel A Hamer +1 612 436 9615 +1 612 436 9605 shamer@ccvl.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian W Hayes +1 612 436 9600 +1 612 436 9605 bhayes@ccvl.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Russell J Rigby +1 612 436 9600 +1 612 436 9605 rrigby@ccvl.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J Derek Vandenburgh +1 612 436 9600 +1 612 436 9605 dvandenburgh@carlsoncaspers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Dorsey & Whitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rabea Jamal Zayed +1 612 492 6711 +1 612 573 6650 zayed.rj@dorsey.com
No Logo OVERHAUSER LAW OFFICES, LLC, Movant
Officially listed as "Paul B. Overhauser"

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul B. Overhauser +1 317 891 1500 +1 866 283 8549 poverhauser@overhauser.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (509) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 509 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: None
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT by Cordis Corporation. (Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 01/29/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 508 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None
    JUDGMENT from USCA Federal Circuit. (jam)DOCUMENT QC'D ON 1-10-13 LGL Modified on 1/10/2013 (LGL). (Entered: 01/07/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 507 Filed: 10/22/2012, Entered: None
      JUDGMENT from USCA Federal Circuit. (TSS) DOCUMENT QC'd by KT on 10/24/12. (KT) (Entered: 10/23/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 506 Filed: 8/30/2012, Entered: None
        NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney. (Merrill, Courtland) Modified on 8/30/2012 (RLR). (Entered: 08/30/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 505 Filed: 5/10/2012, Entered: None
          ORDER from Federal Circuit as to 498 Notice of Appeal to Federal Circuit filed by Norman Noble, Inc., Cordis Corporation : Cordis Corporation and Norman Noble, Inc. move without opposition to withdraw cross appeal no. 20L2- 1191, and for a 40-day extension of time for Spectralytics to file its reply brief in appeal no.20I2-lL2l. Upon consideration thereof, It Is Ordered That: (1) The motion to withdraw 2012-1191 is granted. 20t2-Il9I is dismissed. The revised official caption in 20I2-Il2t is reflected above. (2) Each side shall bear its own costs in 2012-11g1. (3) Spectralytics' reply brief is due within 40 days of the date of filing of this order. (received electronically from COA) (jam) (Entered: 05/10/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 504 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: None
            SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT re 503 Cost Judgment by Spectralytics, Inc.. (Bremer, Dennis) (Entered: 02/15/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 503 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None
              COST JUDGMENT in favor of Spectralytics, Inc. against Cordis Corporation, Norman Noble, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Taxation of Costs Summary)(TP) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 502 Filed: 1/25/2012, Entered: None
                TRANSMITTAL OF APPEAL LETTER TO U. S. FEDERAL CIRCUIT COURT OF APPEALS, Re: Amended Notice of Appeal to Federal Circuit 498 . Documents sent to Federal Circuit conventionally. (MMP) (Entered: 01/25/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 501 Filed: 1/20/2012, Entered: None
                  Response to Objection to Bill of Costs re 500 Objection to Bill of Costs by Spectralytics, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Second Declaration of Dennis C. Bremer, # 2 Exhibit 1 to the 2nd Declaration of Dennis C Bremer, # 3 Exhibit 2 to the Second Declaration of Dennis C Bremer)(Bremer, Dennis) Modified text on 1/23/2012 (MMP). (Entered: 01/20/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 500 Filed: 1/9/2012, Entered: None
                    OBJECTION to Bill of Costs re 494 Bill of Costs by Cordis Corporation, Norman Noble, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B)(Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 01/09/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 499 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: None
                      NOTICE from the Federal Circuit Appeal case #2012-1121. (jam) (Entered: 01/09/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 498 Filed: 12/30/2011, Entered: None
                        AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL TO FEDERAL CIRCUIT by Cordis Corporation, Norman Noble, Inc. (Merrill, Courtland) Modified TEXT on 1/10/2012 (MMP). (Entered: 12/30/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 497 Filed: 12/22/2011, Entered: None
                          TRANSMITTAL OF APPEAL LETTER TO U. S. FEDERAL COURT OF APPEALS Re: Notice of Appeal to Federal Circuit 492 . Documents sent to USCA conventionally. (MMP) (Entered: 12/22/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 496 Filed: 12/21/2011, Entered: None
                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Spectralytics, Inc. re 494 Bill of Costs, 495 Declaration, (Bremer, Dennis) (Entered: 12/21/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 495 Filed: 12/21/2011, Entered: None
                              DECLARATION of Dennis C. Bremer re 494 Bill of Costs by Spectralytics, Inc. . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1, # 2 Exhibit(s) 2, # 3 Exhibit(s) 3, # 4 Exhibit(s) 4, # 5 Exhibit(s) 5, # 6 Exhibit(s) 6, # 7 Exhibit(s) 7, # 8 Exhibit(s) 8, # 9 Exhibit(s) 9, # 10 Exhibit(s) 10, # 11 Exhibit(s) 11, # 12 Exhibit(s) 12)(Bremer, Dennis) (Entered: 12/21/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 494 Filed: 12/21/2011, Entered: None
                                BILL OF COSTS by Spectralytics, Inc.. (Bremer, Dennis) (Entered: 12/21/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 493 Filed: 12/20/2011, Entered: None
                                  RECEIPT number 44641060975 in the amount of $455.00 issued to Anthony Ostlund Baer. (kt) DOCUMENT QC'd by KT on 12/21/11. (KT) (Entered: 12/20/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 492 Filed: 12/20/2011, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE OF APPEAL TO FEDERAL CIRCUIT by Cordis Corporation, Norman Noble, Inc.. (Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 12/20/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 491 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: None
                                      TRANSMITTAL OF APPEAL LETTER TO U. S. COURT OF APPEALS, FEDERAL CIRCUIT, Re: Notice of Appeal to Federal Circuit 489 (re: 487 Order and 488 Judgment. Documents sent to USCA conventionally. (MMP) (Entered: 12/16/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 490 Filed: 12/15/2011, Entered: None
                                        RECEIPT number 44641060894 in the amount of $455.00 issued to Carlson Caspers. (kt) QC'D by CLW on 12/16/2011. (Entered: 12/15/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 489 Filed: 12/15/2011, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE OF APPEAL TO FEDERAL CIRCUIT by Spectralytics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Goggin, Matthew) (Entered: 12/15/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 488 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: None
                                            JUDGMENT (Attachments: # 1 Civil-8th Circuit Pre-Hearing Conference Notice, # 2 Civil Notice - appeal)(MMP) cc: Irene Choi on 11/30/2011 (MMP). (Entered: 11/30/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 486 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER ON STIPULATION OF SATISFACTION OF DAMAGES JUDGMENT re 485 Stipulation filed by Spectralytics, Inc., Norman Noble, Inc., Cordis Corporation. CC: Irene Choi Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 10/28/11. (sf) Modified text on 10/28/2011 (MMP). (Entered: 10/28/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 485 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                STIPULATION Of Satisfaction of Damages Judgment by Cordis Corporation, Norman Noble, Inc., Spectralytics, Inc.. (Bremer, Dennis) (Entered: 10/27/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 484 Filed: 10/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                  ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR, COUNSEL WILL REFILE*** STIPULATION and Order Of Satisfaction of Damages Judgment by Cordis Corporation, Norman Noble, Inc., Spectralytics, Inc. (Bremer, Dennis) Modified on 10/27/2011 (RLR). (Entered: 10/26/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 483 Filed: 10/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                    REPLY re 474 MOTION For Enhanced Damages and Attorney Fees , 475 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Spectralytics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Carlson, Alan) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 482 Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                      LR7.1 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Cordis Corporation re 481 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Cordis Corporation. (Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 481 Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 474 MOTION For Enhanced Damages and Attorney Fees CORRECTED filed by Cordis Corporation. (Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 480 Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                          Declaration of Courtland C. Merrill in Opposition re 474 MOTION For Enhanced Damages and Attorney Fees filed by Cordis Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A-D)(Merrill, Courtland) Modified on 10/7/2011 (kt). (Entered: 10/06/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 479 Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 474 MOTION For Enhanced Damages and Attorney Fees filed by Cordis Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 478 Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 474 MOTION For Enhanced Damages and Attorney Fees filed by Norman Noble, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Niehaus, James) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 477 Filed: 9/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORDER (1) The Motion of Interested Party Paul B. Overhauser to Intervene and Unseal Certain Documents is deemed withdrawn; and (2) Within five (5) business days following the filing of the Stipulation, the Parties will provide to Overhauser PDF copies of the documents listed in Exhibit A, redacted only to the extent necessary to protect confidential information of third parties and proprietary or confidential financial information of the Parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 09/19/2011. (jz) (Entered: 09/20/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 476 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION by Spectralytics, Inc. re 474 MOTION For Enhanced Damages and Attorney Fees. Date and time to be determined. (Carlson, Alan) Modified text on 9/15/2011 (jz). (Entered: 09/15/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 475 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re 474 MOTION For Enhanced Damages and Attorney Fees filed by Spectralytics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Carlson, Alan) (Entered: 09/15/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 474 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                      MOTION For Enhanced Damages and Attorney Fees by Spectralytics, Inc.. (Carlson, Alan) (Entered: 09/15/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 473 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                        MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Eugene M. Gelernter by Cordis Corporation. (Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 472 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney (William E. Craco of Johnson & Johnson) (Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 471 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE by Paul B. Overhauser re 459 MOTION to Intervene of Withdrawal of Motion to Intervene and Unseal Certain Documents WITH ATTACHED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (Overhauser, Paul) Modified text on 9/13/2011 (mmp). (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 470 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting 469 Motion. Spectralytics is not required to file attorney billing records and a detailed, itemized, calculation of attorney's fees it seeks in connection with its original or renewed requests for attorney fees (Docket Nos. 379, 380, 462-63) on Thursday, September 15, 2011. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 9/12/11. (sf) (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 469 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                MOTION Stipulated Motion Concerning Spectralytics' Notice of Intent to Collect Attorney Fees and Motion for Attorney Fees by Spectralytics, Inc., Cordis Corp., and Norman Noble. (Bremer, Dennis) Modified text on 9/9/2011 (MMP). (Entered: 09/09/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 468 Filed: 9/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                  STIPULATION Regarding Withdrawal of Motion to Unseal Certain Documents by Cordis Corporation, Norman Noble, Inc., Paul B. Overhauser, Spectralytics, Inc.. (Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 09/08/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 467 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    ORDER re 466 Stipulation filed by Spectralytics, Inc., Norman Noble, Inc., Cordis Corporation. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. Plaintiff Spectralytics, Inc. must file and serve its renewed motion for enhanced damages and attorney's fees, together with all supporting documents, by September 15, 2011. 2. Defendants Cordis Corp. and Norman Noble, Inc. must each file and serve a response by October 6, 2011. 3. Spectralytics must file its reply memorandum, if any, by October 13, 2011. The August 24, 2011 Order shall remain in all other respects. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 9/2/11. (sf) (Entered: 09/02/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 466 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                      STIPULATION Concerning Briefing Schedule for Spectralytics, Inc.'s Renewed Motion for Enhanced Damages and Attorney's Fees by Cordis Corporation, Norman Noble, Inc., Spectralytics, Inc.. (Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 09/02/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 465 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                        FEDERAL APPEAL JUDGMENT AFFIRMING IN PART, VACATING IN PART, AND REMANDED. ISSUED AS A MANDATE. (kt) Modified on 8/30/2011 (kt). (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 464 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                          FEDERAL APPEAL ORDER AFFIRMING IN PART, VACATING IN PART AND REMANDED. (kt) Modified on 8/29/2011 (kt). (Entered: 08/29/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 463 Filed: 8/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER re 462 Letter to District Judge filed by Spectralytics, Inc. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. Plaintiff Spectralytics, Inc. must file and serve its renewed motion for enhanced damages and attorney's fees, together with all supporting documents, by September 9, 2011. 2. Defendants Cordis Corp. and Norman Noble, Inc. must each file and serve a response by September 30, 2011. 3. Spectralytics must file its reply memorandum, if any, by October 7, 2011. 4. Spectralytics's opening and reply memoranda, together, must not exceed 7,000 words. Each defendant's response must not exceed 7,000 words. 5. Except to the extent that this order provides otherwise, the parties must complywith D. Minn. LR 7.1(b)-(i) in connection with this motion. 6. Unless the Court orders otherwise, the Court will decide the motion on the papers,without a hearing. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 8/24/11. (sf) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 462 Filed: 8/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                              LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Spectralytics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Carlson, Alan) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 461 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                Clerk's Notice of APPLICATION FOR PRO SE LITIGANT TO FILE ELECTRONICALLY. Paul B. Overhauser is GRANTED e-filing privileges in this case. Pursuant to F.R.Cv.P. Rule 5 and 7(d), Paul B. Overhauser has consented to electronic service and has agreed to waive service by other means for all subsequent filings in this case, except when electronic service is not allowed under the rules. (MGV) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 460 Filed: 7/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Due to the retirement of Magistrate Judge Erickson, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Chief Mag. Judge Raymond L. Erickson no longer assigned to the case.NOTE: the new case number is 05cv1464 (PJS/LIB). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. (TSS) (Entered: 07/20/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 459 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                    WITHDRAWN PER 471 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION to Intervene and Unseal Certain Documents by Paul B. Overhauser. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits)(kt) QC'd 8/7/2011 (DDB). Modified TEXT on 9/13/2011 (mmp). (Entered: 07/18/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 458 Filed: 6/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Opinion of United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit as to Notice of Appeal. (kt) DOCUMENT QC'd by KT on 7/19/11. (KT) (Entered: 06/16/2011)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 457 Filed: 4/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                        ORDER United States Court of Appeal for the Federal Circuit dated 4/2/10 signed by Jan Horbaly Clerk, the the order of dismissal and the mandated having been issued in error it is ordered that: the court's March 29, 2010 dismissal order is vacated, the mandate is recalled and the notice of appeal is reinstated. Applellant's reply brief is due on or before 4/8/10. (VEM) (Entered: 04/06/2010)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 456 Filed: 4/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                          VACATED PER ORDER FROM THE UNITED STATES COURT OF APPEAL FOR THE FEDERAL CIRCUIT DOCKET #457- ORDER United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit dated 3/29/10 from Jan Horbaly Clerk. That the notice of appeal be, and the same hereby is, dismissed for failure to prosecute in accordance with the rules. (VEM) Modified TEXT on 4/6/2010 (VEM). (Entered: 04/06/2010)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 455 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS TO ENFORCE THE JUDGMENT re 454 Stipulation filed by Spectralytics, Inc., Norman Noble, Inc., Cordis Corporation. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 2/19/10. (sf) (Entered: 02/19/2010)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 454 Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                              STIPULATION Staying Proccedings to Enforce the Judgment by Cordis Corporation, Norman Noble, Inc., and Spectralytics, Inc. (Merrill, Courtland) Modified text on 2/17/2010 (MMP). (Entered: 02/17/2010)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 453 Filed: 11/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Acknowledgment of Receipt re: 448 TRANSMITTAL OF APPEAL LETTER TO U. S. COURT OF APPEALS, FEDERAL CIRCUIT. (TSS) (Entered: 11/09/2009)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 452 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  LETTER TO CLERK'S OFFICE from Dennis C. Bremer. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service).(Bremer, Dennis) Modified TEXT on 10/26/2009 (MMP). (Entered: 10/26/2009)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 451 Filed: 10/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR WILL REFILE ON LATER DATE CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Spectralytics, Inc. re 450 Declaration in Support, 449 Bill of Costs. (Bremer, Dennis) Modified text on 10/26/2009 (MMP). (Entered: 10/22/2009)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 450 Filed: 10/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-WILL REFILE AT LATER DATE-Declaration of Dennis C. Bremer in Support of 449 Bill of Costs filed by Spectralytics, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1 to 3, # 2 Exhibit(s) 4 to 6)(Bremer, Dennis) Modified text on 10/26/2009 (MMP). (Entered: 10/22/2009)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 449 Filed: 10/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-Premature--BILL OF COSTS by Spectralytics, Inc. (Bremer, Dennis) Modified punctuation on 10/23/2009 (MMP). Modified text on 10/26/2009 (MGV). (Entered: 10/22/2009)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 448 Filed: 10/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          TRANSMITTAL OF APPEAL LETTER TO U. S. COURT OF APPEALS, FEDERAL CIRCUIT, Re: Notice of Appeal to Federal Circuit 447 . Documents sent to USCA conventionally. (kt) Modified text on 10/20/2009 (kt). (Entered: 10/20/2009)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 447 Filed: 10/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEAL TO FEDERAL CIRCUIT as to 445 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, 446 Judgment by Cordis Corporation, Norman Noble, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 10/19/2009)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 446 Filed: 10/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              AMENDED JUDGMENT (Attachments: # 1 Civil-8th Circuit Pre-Hearing Conference Notice, # 2 Civil Notice - appeal)(MMP) (Entered: 10/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 445 Filed: 10/16/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 443 Motion to Amend Judgment.Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 10/16/09. (sf) (Entered: 10/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 444 Filed: 10/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Federal Circuit Case Number 2010-1004 for 438 Notice of Appeal to Federal Circuit, filed by Norman Noble, Inc., Cordis Corporation. (MMP) (Entered: 10/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 443 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Amend/Correct 370 Judgment by Spectralytics, Inc. DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-NOT TO FILE PROPOSED ORDER ON CM ECF(Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bremer, Dennis) Modified text on 10/13/2009 (MMP). (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 442 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION Regarding Damages and Pre-Judgment Interest by Cordis Corporation, Norman Noble, Inc., Spectralytics, Inc. (Bremer, Dennis) Modified punctuation on 10/13/2009 (MMP). (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 441 Filed: 9/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        AMENDED Transmittal Letter to Federal Circuit of Appeals; re: 438 Notice of Appeal to Federal Circuit. Filing fee paid 9/25/09 receipt # 04-037986 for $455 by defendants. (VEM) (Entered: 09/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 440 Filed: 9/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          RECEIPT number 04-37986 in the amount of $455.00 issued to Defendants appeal filing fee. (VEM) DOCUMENT QC'd and added on 10/15/09. (KT) (Entered: 09/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 439 Filed: 9/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Transmittal Letter to Federal Circuit of Appeals; re: 438 Notice of Appeal to Federal Circuit. Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal, Docket Sheet, Orders, Judgment, and Transcript mailed to the Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit.(MMP) (Entered: 09/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 9/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEAL TO FEDERAL CIRCUIT as to 432 Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, 370 Judgment by Cordis Corporation, Norman Noble, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service).(Merrill, Courtland) Modified text on 9/28/2009 (MMP). (Entered: 09/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 437 Filed: 9/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Federal Circuit Case Number 2009-1564 for 433 Notice of Appeal to Federal Circuit, filed by Spectralytics, Inc. (TSS) (Entered: 09/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 436 Filed: 9/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Transmittal Letter to Federal Circuit of Appeals, re: 433 Notice of Appeal to Federal Circuit. cc: All Counsel.(MMP) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/9/2009: # 1 Notice of Appeal) (Entered: 09/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 435 Filed: 9/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Document removed-filed document in error. re: Notice of Appeal. MMP (Entered: 09/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 434 Filed: 9/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      RECEIPT number 44641037549 in the amount of $455.00 issued to Carlson Caspers Vandenburgh. (jam) Document QC'd on 9/11/2009 (nes). (Entered: 09/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 9/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEAL TO FEDERAL CIRCUIT as to 432 Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, by Spectralytics, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service).(Bremer, Dennis) Modified text on 9/9/2009 (MMP). Document QC'd on 9/11/2009 (nes). (Entered: 09/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 9/4/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER ON POST-TRIAL MOTIONS. The post-trial motion of defendants Cordis Corporation and Norman Noble, Inc. for judgment as a matter of law or for a new trial [Docket No. 376 ] is DENIED. The post-trial motion of plaintiff Spectralytics, Inc. [Docket No. 379 ] is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. See order for details. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 09/04/09. (BJS) (Entered: 09/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 6/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Merrill, Courtland) Modified text on 7/1/2009 (MMP). (Entered: 06/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: 6/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Spectralytics, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Vandenburgh, J) Modified text on 6/22/2009 (MMP). (Entered: 06/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 429 Filed: 6/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Cordis Corporation. (Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 06/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 6/15/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Post-Trial Motions Hearing held on 6/8/09 before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (135 pages). Court Reporter: Debra Beauvais (E-mail: Debra_Beauvais@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (651) 848-1223). Redaction Request due 7/6/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/16/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/14/2009. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (db) (Entered: 06/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 6/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. (db) (Entered: 06/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 6/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Spectralytics, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Vandenburgh, J) Modified text on 6/15/2009 (MMP). (Entered: 06/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 6/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        DOCKETED IN ERROR - LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Spectralytics, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Vandenburgh, J) Modified on 6/12/2009 (vem). (Entered: 06/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 6/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Cordis Corporation re Obviousness. (Devine, Jesse) (Entered: 06/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 6/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER. Plaintiff Spectralytics Corporation has requested permission to file a letter addressing issues related to damages. The Court grants permission as follows: 1. Spectralytics may file a letter about issues related to damages on or before Friday, June 12, 2009. The letter may be no longer than two pages. 2. Defendants may respond by letter on or before Friday, June 19, 2009. Defendant's response, which must be filed jointly, may be no longer than two pages. The Court will not entertain any further requests from any party for permission to file letters or briefs. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 06/10/09. (BJS) (Entered: 06/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 422 Filed: 6/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER. Defendant Cordis Corporation has requested permission to file a letter addressing invalidity issues. The Court grants permission as follows. 1. Cordis may file a letter about invalidity issues related to its motion for judgment as a matter of law on or before Friday, June 12, 2009. The letter may be no longer than two pages. 2. Spectralytics may respond by letter on or before Friday, June 19, 2009. Spectralytics's response may be no longer than two pages. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 06/10/09. (BJS) (Entered: 06/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 421 Filed: 6/8/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz: Motion Hearing held on 6/8/2009 re 376 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by Norman Noble, Inc., Cordis Corporation, 379 MOTION For Prejudgment and Post-Judgment Interest, An Accounting, A Permanent Injunction, Enhanced Damages, Costs, and Attorney Fees filed by Spectralytics, Inc. Matter taken under advisement. Written order will issue. (Court Reporter Debra Beauvais) (sf) (Entered: 06/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 420 Filed: 6/5/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Trial held on 1/30/09 before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (180 pages). Court Reporter: Debra Beauvais (E-mail: Debra_Beauvais@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (651) 848-1223). Redaction Request due 6/26/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/6/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/3/2009. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (db) (Entered: 06/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 6/5/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Trial held on 1/29/09 before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (55 pages). Court Reporter: Debra Beauvais (E-mail: Debra_Beauvais@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (651) 848-1223). Redaction Request due 6/26/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/6/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/3/2009. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (db) (Entered: 06/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 418 Filed: 6/5/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Trial held on 1/28/09 before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (295 pages). Court Reporter: Debra Beauvais (E-mail: Debra_Beauvais@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (651) 848-1223). Redaction Request due 6/26/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/6/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/3/2009. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (db) (Entered: 06/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 417 Filed: 6/5/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Trial held on 1/2709 before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (323 pages). Court Reporter: Debra Beauvais (E-mail: Debra_Beauvais@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (651) 848-1223). Redaction Request due 6/26/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/6/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/3/2009. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (db) (Entered: 06/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 416 Filed: 6/5/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Trial held on 1/26/09 before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (57 pages). Court Reporter: Debra Beauvais (E-mail: Debra_Beauvais@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (651) 848-1223). Redaction Request due 6/26/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/6/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/3/2009. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (db) (Entered: 06/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 6/5/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Trial held on 1/23/09 before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (323 pages). Court Reporter: Debra Beauvais (E-mail: Debra_Beauvais@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (651) 848-1223). Redaction Request due 6/26/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/6/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/3/2009. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (db) (Entered: 06/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 414 Filed: 6/5/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Trial held on 1/22/09 before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (237 pages). Court Reporter: Debra Beauvais (E-mail: Debra_Beauvais@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (651) 848-1223). Redaction Request due 6/26/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/6/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/3/2009. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (db) (Entered: 06/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 413 Filed: 6/5/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Trial held on 1/21/09 before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (319 pages). Court Reporter: Debra Beauvais (E-mail: Debra_Beauvais@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (651) 848-1223). Redaction Request due 6/26/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/6/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/3/2009. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (db) (Entered: 06/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 412 Filed: 6/5/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Trial held on 1/20/09 before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (291 pages). Court Reporter: Debra Beauvais (E-mail: Debra_Beauvais@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (651) 848-1223). Redaction Request due 6/26/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/6/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/3/2009. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (db) (Entered: 06/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 411 Filed: 6/5/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Trial held on 1/16/09 before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (267 pages). Court Reporter: Debra Beauvais (E-mail: Debra_Beauvais@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (651) 848-1223). Redaction Request due 6/26/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/6/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/3/2009. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (db) (Entered: 06/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410 Filed: 6/5/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Trial held on 1/15/09 before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (260 pages). Court Reporter: Debra Beauvais (E-mail: Debra_Beauvais@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (651) 848-1223). Redaction Request due 6/26/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/6/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/3/2009. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (db) (Entered: 06/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 6/5/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Trial held on 1/14/09 before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (239 pages). Court Reporter: Debra Beauvais (E-mail: Debra_Beauvais@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (651) 848-1223). Redaction Request due 6/26/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/6/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/3/2009. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (db) (Entered: 06/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 408 Filed: 6/5/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Trial held on 1/13/09 before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (222 pages). Court Reporter: Debra Beauvais (E-mail: Debra_Beauvais@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (651) 848-1223). Redaction Request due 6/26/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/6/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/3/2009. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (db) (Entered: 06/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 6/5/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing (Pretrial Conference) held on 10909 before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (267 pages). Court Reporter: Debra Beauvais (E-mail: Debra_Beauvais@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (651) 848-1223). Redaction Request due 6/26/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/6/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/3/2009. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (db) (Entered: 06/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406 Filed: 6/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. A total of 15 transcripts are associated with this filing. (db) (Entered: 06/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 4/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY re 390 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 395 Amended Document, for Judgment as a Matter of Law or, in the Alternative, for Reduction or Remittitur of Damages or for a New Trial filed by Norman Noble, Inc., Cordis Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 04/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Spectralytics, Inc. re 403 Declaration in Support, 402 Reply (Bremer, Dennis) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Dennis C. Bremer in Support of 402 Reply filed by Spectralytics, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 11, # 2 Exhibit 12)(Bremer, Dennis) Modified on 4/13/2009 (MMP). (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY re 397 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Spectralytics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Bremer, Dennis) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 401 Filed: 4/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 376 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by Spectralytics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Bremer, Dennis) (Entered: 04/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 3/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cordis Corporation re 399 Declaration in Opposition, 397 Response in Opposition to Motion, 398 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate (Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 03/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 3/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Courtland C. Merrill in Opposition to 397 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Cordis Corporation. (Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 03/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 3/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LR7.1 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Cordis Corporation re 397 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Cordis Corporation. (Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 03/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 397 Filed: 3/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 379 MOTION For Prejudgment and Post-Judgment Interest, An Accounting, A Permanent Injunction, Enhanced Damages, Costs, and Attorney Fees filed by Cordis Corporation. (Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 03/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 3/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Norman Noble, Inc., Cordis Corporation re 395 Amended Document, Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Post-Trial Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, or in the Alternative, for Reduction or Remittitur of Damages or for a New Trial (Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 03/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 3/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED DOCUMENT by Norman Noble, Inc., Cordis Corporation. Amendment to 390 Memorandum in Support of Motion (Post-Trial) for Judgment as a Matter of Law, or in the Alternative, for Reduction or Remittitur of Damages or for a New Trial. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 03/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Spectralytics, Inc. re 393 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate (Bremer, Dennis) (Entered: 03/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LR7.1 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Spectralytics, Inc. re 388 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Spectralytics, Inc. (Bremer, Dennis) Modified on 3/4/2009 (MMP). (Entered: 03/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LR7.1 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Norman Noble, Inc., Cordis Corporation re 390 Memorandum in Support of Motion. (Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 03/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Norman Noble, Inc., Cordis Corporation re 390 Memorandum in Support of Motion (Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re 376 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by Norman Noble, Inc., Cordis Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 2/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Spectralytics, Inc. re 387 Declaration in Support, 385 Declaration in Support, 384 Declaration in Support, 386 Declaration in Support, 388 Memorandum in Support of Motion (Bremer, Dennis) Modified on 2/24/2009 (MMP). (Entered: 02/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 2/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re 379 MOTION For Prejudgment and Post-Judgment Interest, An Accounting, A Permanent Injunction, Enhanced Damages, Costs, and Attorney Fees filed by Spectralytics, Inc. (Bremer, Dennis) Modified on 2/24/2009 (MMP). (Entered: 02/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 2/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Dennis C. Bremer in Support of 379 MOTION For Prejudgment and Post-Judgment Interest, An Accounting, A Permanent Injunction, Enhanced Damages, Costs, and Attorney Fees filed by Spectralytics, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Part A, # 2 Exhibit(s) Part B, # 3 Exhibit(s) 2, # 4 Exhibit(s) 3, # 5 Exhibit(s) 4, # 6 Exhibit(s) 5, # 7 Exhibit(s) 6, # 8 Exhibit(s) 7, # 9 Exhibit(s) 8, # 10 Exhibit(s) 9, # 11 Exhibit(s) 10)(Bremer, Dennis) Modified on 2/24/2009 (MMP). (Entered: 02/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 2/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Julie Davis in Support of 379 MOTION For Prejudgment and Post-Judgment Interest, An Accounting, A Permanent Injunction, Enhanced Damages, Costs, and Attorney Fees filed by Spectralytics, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s)(A)(Bremer, Dennis) Modified on 2/24/2009 (MMP). (Entered: 02/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 2/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Kenneth Neu in Support of 379 MOTION For Prejudgment and Post-Judgment Interest, An Accounting, A Permanent Injunction, Enhanced Damages, Costs, and Attorney Fees filed by Spectralytics, Inc. (Bremer, Dennis) Modified on 2/24/2009 (MMP). SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 2/23/09. (KT) (Entered: 02/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 2/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Russell J. Rigby in Support of 379 MOTION For Prejudgment and Post-Judgment Interest, An Accounting, A Permanent Injunction, Enhanced Damages, Costs, and Attorney Fees filed by Spectralytics, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Placeholder for Exhibit A to C)(Bremer, Dennis) Modified on 2/23/2009 (MMP). SEALED DOCUMENTS RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 2/23/09. (KT) (Entered: 02/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 2/23/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re 382 Stipulation filed by Spectralytics, Inc., Norman Noble, Inc., Cordis Corporation. IT IS ORDERED THAT: 1. Spectralytics is not required to file attorney billing records and a detailed, itemized, calculation of attorneys fees it seeks in connection with its Motion or Notice of Intent (Docket Nos. 379 and 380) on Monday, February 23, 2009; and 2. In the event that the Court rules that an award of attorney fees is appropriate, Spectralytics shall, within ten days of any such ruling, file and serve a detailed, itemized, calculation of attorney fees, to which Defendants may file and serve objections within ten days after receiving Spectralytics' filing. See order for other details. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 2/23/09. (sf) (Entered: 02/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION Motion Concerning Spectralytics' notice of Intent to Collect Attorney Fees and Motion For Attorney Fees by Norman Noble, Inc., Spectralytics, Inc., Cordis Corporation. (Bremer, Dennis) (Entered: 02/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Spectralytics, Inc. re 380 Notice of Hearing on Motion, 379 MOTION For Prejudgment and Post-Judgment Interest, An Accounting, A Permanent Injunction, Enhanced Damages, Costs, and Attorney Fees (Bremer, Dennis) (Entered: 02/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 379 MOTION For Prejudgment and Post-Judgment Interest, An Accounting, A Permanent Injunction, Enhanced Damages, Costs, and Attorney Fees : Motion Hearing set for 4/27/2009 08:30 AM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Bremer, Dennis) (Entered: 02/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION For Prejudgment and Post-Judgment Interest, An Accounting, A Permanent Injunction, Enhanced Damages, Costs, and Attorney Fees by Spectralytics, Inc. (Bremer, Dennis) Modified on 2/18/2009 (MMP). (Entered: 02/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Norman Noble, Inc., Cordis Corporation re 376 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law, 377 Notice (Other) of Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law (Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 02/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Norman Noble, Inc., Cordis Corporation re 376 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law (Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 02/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Norman Noble, Inc., Cordis Corporation. (Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 02/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Spectralytics, Inc. Of Intent to Claim An Award of Attorney's Fees (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Bremer, Dennis) (Entered: 02/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 2/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Court's (Corrected) Final Exhibit List (Defendants' Exhibits). (sf) (Entered: 02/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 2/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re 371 Stipulation filed by Spectralytics, Inc., Norman Noble, Inc., Cordis Corporation. See Order for deadlines and word limits. This order does not modify the deadlines found in Rule 50 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 2/9/09. (sf) (Entered: 02/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 2/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR//ORDER re 371 Stipulation filed by Spectralytics, Inc., Norman Noble, Inc., Cordis Corporation. See Order for deadlines and word limits. This order does not modify the deadlines found in Rule 50 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 2/9/09. (sf) Modified text on 2/9/2009 (jdf). (Entered: 02/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION To Set Post-Trial Briefing Schedule by all parties. (Merrill, Courtland) Modified on 2/9/2009 (MMP). (Entered: 02/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 2/3/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JUDGMENT in favor of Spectralytics, Inc. against Cordis Corporation, Norman Noble, Inc. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 2/3/09. (Attachments: # 1 Civil-8th Circuit Pre-Hearing Conference Notice, # 2 Civil Notice - appeal)(VEM) (Entered: 02/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 2/3/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re 368 Jury Verdict. It is hereby ORDERED that judgment be entered in accordance with the jury's verdict. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 2/3/09. (sf) (Entered: 02/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 2/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SPECIAL REDACTED JURY VERDICT for Spectralytics against Cordis Corporation and Norman Noble, Inc. (Pursuant to the E-Government Act, an unredacted version of this document is filed under seal.)(jdf) (Entered: 02/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 2/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER OF THE COURT TO JURY QUESTION #1. (jdf) (Entered: 02/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 2/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No. 1 JURY QUESTION(s). (jdf) (Entered: 02/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 2/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Court's Final Exhibit List (Defendants' Exhibits). (sf) (Entered: 02/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 2/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Court's Final Exhibit List (Plaintiff's Exhibits). (sf) (Entered: 02/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 2/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz: Jury Trial completed on 2/2/2009. Jury Question 1 received and answered. Jury returned a verdict. Clerk to file Verdict. Exhibits ordered to be returned to the parties. (Court Reporter Debra Beauvais) (sf) (Entered: 02/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz: Jury Trial continued on 1/30/2009. Closing arguments. Jury received case at 3:30 p.m. Jury is without a verdict and will resume deliberations at 9:00 a.m. on 2/2/09. (Court Reporter Debra Beauvais/Kristine Mousseau) (sf) (Entered: 01/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Final Jury Instructions. (sf) (Entered: 01/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 1/29/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz: Motion Hearing and Final Charging Conference held on 1/29/2009; denying 330 Motion to Strike Testimony of Fritz Muller and to Give a Curative Instruction to the Jury ; denying 339 Motion to Strike Testimony of Jon Dunbar and to Give a Curative Instruction to the Jury ; denying 341 Motion For a Jury Instruction on Corroboration ; granting 348 Motion For an Instruction that the 1995 LPL Machines Are Undisputed Prior Art, or in the Alternative, that Spectralytics Cannot Corroborate a Conception Date Prior to November 28, 1995. (Court Reporter Debra Beauvais) (sf) (Entered: 01/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 1/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Spectralytics, Inc. re 357 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, (Bremer, Dennis) (Entered: 01/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 1/29/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Spectralytics, Inc. re 356 Letter to District Judge (Bremer, Dennis) (Entered: 01/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 1/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 348 MOTION For an Instruction that the 1995 LPL Machines Are Undisputed Prior Art, or in the Alternative, that Spectralytics Cannot Corroborate a Conception Date Prior to November 28, 1995 filed by Spectralytics, Inc. (Rigby, Russell) Modified on 1/29/2009 (MMP). (Entered: 01/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 1/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Spectralytics, Inc. (Rigby, Russell) Modified on 1/29/2009 (MMP). (Entered: 01/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 1/28/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz: Jury Trial continued on 1/28/2009. Plaintiff's Witnesses: Patrick Madsen, Bruce Cerepak. Plaintiff rests. (Court Reporter Debra Beauvais) (sf) (Entered: 01/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 1/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 330 MOTION to Strike Testimony of Fritz Muller and to Give a Curative Instruction to the Jury, 341 MOTION For a Jury Instruction on Corroboration, 339 MOTION to Strike Testimony of Jon Dunbar and to Give a Curative Instruction to the Jury (Amended) filed by all defendants. (Devine, Jesse) (Entered: 01/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 1/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Exhibit List : Parties' Fifth Joint List of Exhibits to Be Admitted by Stipulation by Norman Noble, Inc., Spectralytics, Inc., Cordis Corporation. (Devine, Jesse) (Entered: 01/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 1/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LR7.1 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by all defendants re 351 Memorandum in Support of Motion, filed by all defendants. (Devine, Jesse) (Entered: 01/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 1/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support re 348 MOTION For an Instruction that the 1995 LPL Machines Are Undisputed Prior Art, or in the Alternative, that Spectralytics Cannot Corroborate a Conception Date Prior to November 28, 1995 filed by all defendants. (Devine, Jesse) (Entered: 01/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 1/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Courtland C. Merrill in Support of 348 MOTION For an Instruction that the 1995 LPL Machines Are Undisputed Prior Art, or in the Alternative, that Spectralytics Cannot Corroborate a Conception Date Prior to November 28, 1995 filed by all defendants. (Devine, Jesse) SEALED DOCUMENTS RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE. Modified text on 1/28/2009 (jdf). (Entered: 01/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 1/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 348 Motion for an Instruction. Date and time to be determined by the Court.(Devine, Jesse) Modified on 1/28/2009 (MMP). (Entered: 01/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 1/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION For an Instruction that the 1995 LPL Machines Are Undisputed Prior Art, or in the Alternative, that Spectralytics Cannot Corroborate a Conception Date Prior to November 28, 1995 by Norman Noble, Inc., Cordis Corporation. (Devine, Jesse) (Entered: 01/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 1/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 330 MOTION to Strike Testimony of Fritz Muller and to Give a Curative Instruction to the Jury, 341 MOTION For a Jury Instruction on Corroboration, 339 MOTION to Strike Testimony of Jon Dunbar and to Give a Curative Instruction to the Jury filed by Norman Noble, Inc., Cordis Corporation. (Fischer, Aron) (Entered: 01/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 1/27/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz: Jury Trial continued on 1/27/2009. Defendants' witnesses: William Dobbins, Richard Press, Vincent Thomas. Defendants rest. Plaintiff's witnesses: Donald Stires, Joseph Gruchacz. (Court Reporter Debra Beauvais/Kristine Mousseau) (sf) (Entered: 01/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz: Hearing Out of Jury Presence held on 1/26/2009. (Court Reporter Kristine Mousseau) (sf) (Entered: 01/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Spectralytics, Inc. re 341 MOTION For a Jury Instruction on Corroboration, 342 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 343 Notice of Hearing on Motion (Bremer, Dennis) (Entered: 01/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 341 MOTION For a Jury Instruction on Corroboration : Motion Hearing set for 1/27/2009 09:00 AM in St. Paul - Courtroom 7B before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Bremer, Dennis) (Entered: 01/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re 341 MOTION For a Jury Instruction on Corroboration PLACEHOLDER filed by Spectralytics, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Bremer, Dennis) Modified on 1/27/2009 (MMP). SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE. Modified text on 1/28/2009 (jdf). (Entered: 01/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION For a Jury Instruction on Corroboration by Spectralytics, Inc. (Bremer, Dennis) Modified on 1/27/2009 (MMP). (Entered: 01/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Spectralytics, Inc. re 336 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 335 Notice of Hearing on Motion, 339 MOTION to Strike Testimony of Jon Dunbar and to Give a Curative Instruction to the Jury (Bremer, Dennis) (Entered: 01/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Strike Testimony of Jon Dunbar and to Give a Curative Instruction to the Jury by Spectralytics, Inc. (Bremer, Dennis) Modified on 1/27/2009 (MMP). (Entered: 01/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Spectralytics, Inc. re 332 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 330 MOTION to Strike Testimony of Fritz Muller and to Give a Curative Instruction to the Jury, 333 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate, 331 Notice of Hearing on Motion, (Bremer, Dennis) (Entered: 01/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of James Hietala in Support of 330 MOTION to Strike Testimony of Fritz Muller and to Give a Curative Instruction to the Jury filed by Spectralytics, Inc. SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE (Bremer, Dennis) Modified text on 1/26/2009 (jdf). (Entered: 01/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re 334 MOTION to Strike Testimony of Jon Dunbar and to Give a Curative Instruction to the Jury filed by Spectralytics, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Bremer, Dennis) Modified on 1/27/2009 (MMP). (Entered: 01/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 334 MOTION to Strike Testimony of Jon Dunbar and to Give a Curative Instruction to the Jury : Motion Hearing set for 1/27/2009 09:00 AM in St. Paul - Courtroom 7B before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Bremer, Dennis) (Entered: 01/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR: INCORRECT DOCUMENT ATTACHED. MOTION to Strike Testimony of Jon Dunbar and to Give a Curative Instruction to the Jury by Spectralytics, Inc. (Bremer, Dennis) Modified on 1/26/2009 (kt). Modified on 1/27/2009 (MMP). (Entered: 01/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LR7.1 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Spectralytics, Inc. re 332 Memorandum in Support of Motion. (Bremer, Dennis) (Entered: 01/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re 330 MOTION to Strike Testimony of Fritz Muller and to Give a Curative Instruction to the Jury Placeholder filed by Spectralytics, Inc. SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE (Bremer, Dennis) Modified text on 1/26/2009 (jdf). (Entered: 01/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 330 MOTION to Strike Testimony of Fritz Muller and to Give a Curative Instruction to the Jury : Motion Hearing set for 1/27/2009 09:00 AM in St. Paul - Courtroom 7B before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Bremer, Dennis) (Entered: 01/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Strike Testimony of Fritz Muller and to Give a Curative Instruction to the Jury by Spectralytics, Inc. (Bremer, Dennis) Modified on 1/27/2009 (MMP). (Entered: 01/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cordis Corporation re 326 Exhibit List, 328 Exhibit List, 325 Exhibit List, 327 Exhibit List (Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 01/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Exhibit List Fourth Joint List of Exhibits to be Admitted by Stipulation by Norman Noble, Inc., Spectralytics, Inc., Cordis Corporation. (Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 01/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Exhibit List Third Joint List of Exhibits to be Admitted by Stipulation by Norman Noble, Inc., Spectralytics, Inc., Cordis Corporation. (Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 01/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Exhibit List Second Joint List to be Admitted by Stipulation by Norman Noble, Inc., Spectralytics, Inc., Cordis Corporation. (Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 01/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Exhibit List First Joint to be Admitted by Stipulation by Norman Noble, Inc., Spectralytics, Inc., Cordis Corporation. (Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 01/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 1/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  BRIEF Defendants' Submission Regarding Expert Witness Paul Brennan. (Devine, Jesse) (Entered: 01/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz: Jury Trial continued on 1/23/2009. Defendants Witnesses: Jeff Miller (contd); John Dunbar, James Pellegrini, Paul Huber, Fritz Muller (Court Reporter Debra Beauvais/Kristine Mousseau) (sf) (Entered: 01/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OBJECTION re 317 Proposed Jury Instructions filed by Spectralytics, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Rigby, Russell) Modified on 1/23/2009 (MMP). (Entered: 01/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Cordis Corporation in Reply to Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Damages. (Devine, Jesse) (Entered: 01/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - NOT A LETTER - WILL RE-FILE LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Spectralytics, Inc.. (Rigby, Russell) Modified on 1/23/2009 (jam). (Entered: 01/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Spectralytics, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Bremer, Dennis) Modified on 1/23/2009 (MMP). (Entered: 01/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Cordis Corporation regarding special verdict charges. (Fischer, Aron) (Entered: 01/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Jury Instructions submitted by Norman Noble, Inc., Cordis Corporation. (Fischer, Aron) (Entered: 01/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz: Jury Trial continued on 1/22/2009. Charging conference held. Defendants' Witnesses: George Mackaronis (cont'd), Jeff Miller. (Court Reporter Debra Beauvais/Kristine Mousseau) (sf) (Entered: 01/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Spectralytics, Inc. re 314 Declaration in Support, 313 Memorandum, (Bremer, Dennis) (Entered: 01/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Dennis C. Bremer in Support of 313 Memorandum, filed by Spectralytics, Inc. (Bremer, Dennis)SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 1/22/09. Modified on 1/22/2009 (MMP). Modified text on 1/23/2009 (jdf). (Entered: 01/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM by Spectralytics, Inc. re 312 Letter to District Judge In Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Preclude Damages Theory Based on Use or Throughput Royalty filed by Spectralytics, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Bremer, Dennis) Modified on 1/22/2009 (MMP). (Entered: 01/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Cordis Corporation. (Fischer, Aron) (Entered: 01/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Cordis Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) P-77, # 2 Exhibit(s) P-79, # 3 Exhibit(s) Transcript excerpts, # 4 Exhibit(s) Transcript excerpts (2))(Fischer, Aron) (Entered: 01/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 1/21/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz: Jury Trial continued on 1/21/2009. Plaintiff witness: Julie Davis (cont'd). Defendants witnesses: Chris Noble, George Markaronis. First JMOL denied. Second JMOL under advisement. (Court Reporter Debra Beauvais/Kristine Mousseau) (sf) (Entered: 01/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 1/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BRIEF Supplemental Memorandum Concerning Claim Construction. (Fischer, Aron) (Entered: 01/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 1/20/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz: Jury Trial continued on 1/20/2009. Plaintiff's witnesses: Patrick Madsen (cont'd), Raymond Suhy, Ed Przeracki, Larry Noble, Scott Noble, Julie Davis (Court Reporter Debra Beauvais/Kristine Mousseau) (sf) (Entered: 01/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 1/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Exhibit List Third Revised by Cordis Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 01/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 1/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Service by Cordis Corporation re 303 Declaration in Support, 302 Memorandum Concerning Construction of the "Sized to be Slightly Greater Than" Claim (Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 01/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 1/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EXHIBIT re 302 Memorandum Word Count Compliance Certificate by Cordis Corporation. (Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 01/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 1/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Spectralytics, Inc. re 301 Brief Regarding Additional Claim Construction (Bremer, Dennis) (Entered: 01/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 1/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of PLACEHOLDER Courtland C. Merrill in Support of 302 Memorandum filed by all defendants. SEALED DOCUMENT FILED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 1/20/09(Merrill, Courtland) Modified text on 1/23/2009 (jdf). (Entered: 01/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 1/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM by all defendants PLACEHOLDER in Support of Claim Construction filed by all defendants. SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 1/20/9(Merrill, Courtland) Modified text on 1/23/2009 (jdf). (Entered: 01/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 1/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BRIEF Regarding Additional Claim Construction filed by Spectralytics, Inc. (Rigby, Russell) Modified on 1/20/2009 (MMP). (Entered: 01/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz: Jury Trial continued on 1/16/2009. Plaintiff's Witnesses: Gary Gustafson (contd), Jack Lundeen, Larry Nixon, Mark Goemer, Patrick Madsen (Court Reporter Debra Beauvais/Kristine Mousseau) (sf) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 1/15/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz: Jury Trial continued on 1/15/2009. Plaintiff's Witnesses: Gary Oberg (cont'd); Gary Gustafson (Court Reporter Debra Beauvais/Kristine Mousseau) (sf) (Entered: 01/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Cordis Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s))(Fischer, Aron) (Entered: 01/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz: Jury Trial continued on 1/14/2009. Plaintiff's Witness: Gary Oberg. (Court Reporter Debra Beauvais/Kristine Mousseau) (sf) (Entered: 01/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Norman Noble, Inc., Cordis Corporation. (Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 01/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Spectralytics, Inc. re 294 Exhibit List -Revised (Rigby, Russell) (Entered: 01/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Exhibit List -Revised by Spectralytics, Inc. (Rigby, Russell) Modified on 1/14/2009 (MMP). (Entered: 01/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 1/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz: Jury Selection, Jury Impaneled, Jury Trial begun on 1/13/2009. Opening Statements. (Court Reporter Debra Beauvais/Kristine Mousseau) (sf) (Entered: 01/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 1/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Spectralytics, Inc. re 291 Declaration in Support, 290 Letter to District Judge (Bremer, Dennis) (Entered: 01/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 1/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Joseph W. Winkels in Support of 290 Letter to District Judge filed by Spectralytics, Inc. SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 1/13/09. (Bremer, Dennis) Modified on 1/14/2009 (MMP). Modified text on 1/14/2009 (jdf). (Entered: 01/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 1/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Spectralytics, Inc. PLACEHOLDER. (Bremer, Dennis)SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE 1/13/09. Modified text on 1/14/2009 (jdf). (Entered: 01/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 1/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying WITHOUT PREJUDICE 273 Motion to Exclude; granting 277 Motion to Exclude; granting in part and denying in part 167 Motion in Limine; withdrawing 169 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 171 Motion in Limine; granting 173 Motion in Limine; granting 175 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 177 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 179 Motion in Limine; denying WITHOUT PREJUDICE 181 Motion in Limine; denying 182 Motion in Limine; granting 188 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 210 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 212 Motion in Limine; denying WITHOUT PREJUDICE 214 Motion in Limine; granting 217 Motion in Limine; granting 219 Motion in Limine; granting 250 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying 255 Motion for Judgment. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFIC DETAILS). Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 01/13/09. (bjs) (Entered: 01/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 1/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER - To entirely defeat Spectralytics's infringement case, Cordis and Norman Noble must establish that at no time when the accused device is in operation is the bore's inner diameter slightly greater than the stock tubing's outer diameter at the scale that matters to a person of ordinary skill in the art. If the bore's inner diameter equals the stock tubing's outer diameter for part of the time but, for another part of time, the bore's inner diameter slightly exceeds the stock tubing's outer diameter, then the accused device infringes for the latter part of the time. The Court's claim construction may be incorrect. If it is, defendants can seek relief on appeal. In the meantime, though, defendants must try their infringement case consistently with that construction. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 01/13/09. (bjs) (Entered: 01/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 1/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Spectralytics, Inc. re 285 Declaration in Support, 286 Declaration in Support, 284 Memorandum in Support of Motion (Bremer, Dennis) (Entered: 01/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 1/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Jyotirmoy Mazumder in Support of 284 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Spectralytics, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-4)(Bremer, Dennis) Modified on 1/13/2009 (MMP). (Entered: 01/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 1/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Patrick Madsen in Support of 284 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Spectralytics, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-3)(Bremer, Dennis) Modified on 1/13/2009 (MMP). (Entered: 01/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 1/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re 214 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Proposed Expert Testimony of Paul Brennan at Trial (SUPPLEMENTAL) filed by Spectralytics, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Bremer, Dennis) Modified on 1/13/2009 (MMP). (Entered: 01/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 1/12/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Spectralytics, Inc. re 282 Letter to District Judge (Bremer, Dennis) (Entered: 01/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 1/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Spectralytics, Inc. (Bremer, Dennis) Modified on 1/12/2009 (MMP). (Entered: 01/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 1/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Exhibit List Second Revised by Norman Noble, Inc., Cordis Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 01/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 1/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Cordis Corporation. (Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 01/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 1/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support re 277 MOTION to Exclude Evidence and Argument Regarding Opinion of Counsel Placeholder filed by Norman Noble, Inc., Cordis Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Merrill, Courtland) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 1/2/09. Modified text on 1/14/2009 (jdf). (Entered: 01/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 1/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re: Motion to Exclude Evidence and Argument Regarding Opinion of Counsel 277 . Date and time to be determined by the Court.(Merrill, Courtland) Modified on 1/12/2009 (MMP). (Entered: 01/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 1/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Exclude Evidence and Argument Regarding Opinion of Counsel by Norman Noble, Inc., Cordis Corporation. (Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 01/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 1/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Christipher C. Koehler in Support of 273 MOTION to Exclude Uncorroborated Evidence of Spectralytics' Invention filed by Norman Noble, Inc., Cordis Corporation. SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 1/12/09. (Merrill, Courtland) Modified text on 1/14/2009 (jdf). (Entered: 01/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 1/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re 273 MOTION to Exclude Uncorroborated Evidence of Spectralytics' Invention filed by Norman Noble, Inc., Cordis Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Merrill, Courtland) SEALED DOCUMENT RECIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 1/12/09. Modified text on 1/14/2009 (jdf). (Entered: 01/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 1/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re: Motion to Exclude Uncorroborated Evidence of Spectralytics' Invention 273 . Date and time to be determined by the Court. (Merrill, Courtland) Modified on 1/12/2009 (MMP). (Entered: 01/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 1/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Exclude Uncorroborated Evidence of Spectralytics' Invention by Norman Noble, Inc., Cordis Corporation. (Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 01/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 1/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Spectralytics, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Bremer, Dennis) Modified on 1/12/2009 (MMP). (Entered: 01/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 1/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz: Final Pretrial Conference held on 1/9/2009. Written order will issue. (Court Reporter Debra Beauvais) (sf) (Entered: 01/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 1/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LR7.1 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Cordis Corporation re 261 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 01/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 1/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Jeffrey Miller in Opposition to 261 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Cordis Corporation. SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 1/8/09(Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Merrill, Courtland) Modified text on 1/9/2009 (jdf). (Entered: 01/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 1/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Paul Brennan in Opposition to 261 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Cordis Corporation. SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 1/8/09 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Merrill, Courtland) Modified text on 1/9/2009 (jdf). (Entered: 01/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 1/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Spectralytics, Inc. re 264 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 265 Declaration in Support, 266 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate (Bremer, Dennis) (Entered: 01/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 1/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LR7.1 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Spectralytics, Inc. re 264 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. (Bremer, Dennis) (Entered: 01/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 1/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Joseph W. Winkels and Exhibits (PLACEHOLDER) in Support of 264 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Spectralytics, Inc. SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 1/8/09 (Bremer, Dennis) Modified on 1/8/2009 (MMP). Modified text on 1/9/2009 (jdf). (Entered: 01/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 1/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 250 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law (PLACEHOLDER) filed by Spectralytics, Inc. SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 1/8/09 (Bremer, Dennis) Modified text on 1/8/2009 (MMP). Modified text on 1/9/2009 (jdf). (Entered: 01/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 1/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Exhibit List Revised by Norman Noble, Inc., Cordis Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 01/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 1/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Courtland C. Merrill in Opposition to 255 MOTION for Judgment on Infringement and Sanctions filed by Cordis Corporation. SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 1/8/09(Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Merrill, Courtland) Modified text on 1/9/2009 (jdf). (Entered: 01/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 1/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 255 MOTION for Judgment on Infringement and Sanctions Placeholder filed by Norman Noble, Inc., Cordis Corporation. SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 1/8/09(Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Merrill, Courtland) Modified text on 1/9/2009 (jdf). (Entered: 01/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 1/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Spectralytics, Inc. re 259 Notice of Hearing on Motion, 257 Declaration in Support, 258 Declaration in Support, 256 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 255 MOTION for Judgment on Infringement and Sanctions (Bremer, Dennis) (Entered: 01/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 1/6/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 255 MOTION for Judgment on Infringement and Sanctions : Motion Hearing set for 1/9/2009 09:00 AM in St. Paul - Courtroom 7B before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Bremer, Dennis) (Entered: 01/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 1/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Dennis C. Bremer and Exhibits 1-14 (PLACEHOLDER) in Support of 255 MOTION for Judgment on Infringement and Sanctions filed by Spectralytics, Inc. SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE (Bremer, Dennis) Modified on 1/7/2009 (MMP). Modified text on 1/7/2009 (jdf). (Entered: 01/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 1/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Patrick Madsen and Exhibits 1-5 (PLACEHOLDER) in Support of 255 MOTION for Judgment on Infringement and Sanctions filed by Spectralytics, Inc. SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE (Bremer, Dennis) Modified text on 1/7/2009 (MMP). Modified text on 1/7/2009 (jdf). (Entered: 01/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 1/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re 255 MOTION for Judgment on Infringement and Sanctions (PLACEHOLDER) filed by Spectralytics, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Bremer, Dennis) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE. Modified on 1/7/2009 (MMP). Modified text on 1/7/2009 (jdf). (Entered: 01/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 1/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Judgment on Infringement and Sanctions by Spectralytics, Inc. (Bremer, Dennis) Modified on 1/7/2009 (MMP). (Entered: 01/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 1/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Norman Noble, Inc. re 250 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law, 252 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 253 Declaration in Support, 251 Notice of Hearing on Motion (Pulju, Lee) (Entered: 01/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 1/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of James B. Niehaus in Support of 250 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by Norman Noble, Inc. (Pulju, Lee) Modified on 1/7/2009 (MMP). SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 1/6/09. (KT) (Entered: 01/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 1/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re 250 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Placeholder filed by Norman Noble, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Pulju, Lee) Modified on 1/7/2009 (MMP). SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 1/6/09. (KT) (Entered: 01/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 1/6/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 250 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law : Motion Hearing set for 1/9/2009 09:00 AM in St. Paul - Courtroom 7B before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Pulju, Lee) (Entered: 01/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 1/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Norman Noble, Inc. (Pulju, Lee) Modified on 1/7/2009 (MMP). (Entered: 01/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 12/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Spectralytics, Inc. re 240 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 241 Declaration in Support, 248 Declaration in Support, 245 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 235 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 237 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 242 Exhibit, 246 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 244 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 243 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 236 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 238 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 239 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 247 Exhibit (Bremer, Dennis) (Entered: 12/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 12/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Samuel R. Phillips in Support of 236 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Spectralytics, Inc. (Bremer, Dennis) Modified on 1/5/2009 (MMP). (Entered: 12/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 12/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EXHIBIT re 241 Declaration in Support, by Spectralytics, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. 36 part 2, # 2 Ex. 36 part 3, # 3 Ex. 36 part 4, # 4 Ex. 36 part 5)(Bremer, Dennis) Modified on 1/5/2009 (MMP). (Entered: 12/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 12/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 188 MOTION in Limine No. 5 filed by Spectralytics, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Bremer, Dennis) Modified on 1/5/2009 (MMP) (Entered: 12/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 12/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 181 MOTION in Limine No. 5 filed by Spectralytics, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Bremer, Dennis) Modified on 1/5/2009 (MMP). (Entered: 12/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 12/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 167 MOTION in Limine No. 1 filed by Spectralytics, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Bremer, Dennis) Modified on 1/5/2009 (MMP). (Entered: 12/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 12/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 175 MOTION in Limine No. 3 filed by Spectralytics, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Bremer, Dennis) Modified on 1/5/2009 (MMP). (Entered: 12/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 12/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EXHIBIT re 241 Declaration in Support, by Spectralytics, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. 6, # 2 Ex. 10, # 3 Ex. 11, # 4 Ex. 12, # 5 Ex. 13, # 6 Ex. 38, # 7 Ex. 39, # 8 Ex. 40 part 1, # 9 Ex. 40 part 2, # 10 Ex. 43, # 11 Ex. 44, # 12 Ex. 45, # 13 Ex. 46, # 14 Ex. 47, # 15 Ex. 49, # 16 Ex. 53, # 17 Ex. 54, # 18 Ex. 55, # 19 Ex. 56)(Bremer, Dennis) Modified on 1/5/2009 (MMP). (Entered: 12/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 12/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Russell J. Rigby in Support of 240 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 235 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 237 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 236 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 238 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 239 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Spectralytics, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Placeholder for under seal exhs.)(Bremer, Dennis) Modified on 1/5/2009 (MMP). SEALED DOCUMENTS RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 12/31/08. (KT) (Entered: 12/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 12/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 177 MOTION in Limine No. 4 filed by Spectralytics, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Bremer, Dennis) Modified on 1/5/2009 (MMP). SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 12/31/08. (KT) (Entered: 12/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 12/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 173 MOTION in Limine No. 2 filed by Spectralytics, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Bremer, Dennis) Modified on 1/5/2009 (MMP). SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 12/31/08. (KT) (Entered: 12/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 12/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 171 MOTION in Limine No. 1 filed by Spectralytics, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Bremer, Dennis) Modified on 1/5/2009 (MMP). SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 12/31/08. (KT) (Entered: 12/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 12/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 182 MOTION in Limine No. 4 filed by Spectralytics, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Bremer, Dennis) Modified on 1/5/2009 (MMP). SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 12/31/08. (KT) (Entered: 12/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 12/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 179 MOTION in Limine No. 3 filed by Spectralytics, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Bremer, Dennis) Modified on 1/5/2009 (MMP) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 12/31/08. (KT) (Entered: 12/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 12/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 169 MOTION in Limine No. 2 filed by Spectralytics, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Bremer, Dennis) Modified on 1/5/2009 (MMP). SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 12/31/08. (KT) (Entered: 12/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 12/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Courtland C. Merrill in Opposition to 210 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Negotiations and Sale Price of Spectralytics, 217 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence, Testimony and Argument Relating to Discussions, Decisions, or Investigations by Defendants, LPL and/or RMS into Obtaining a Patent, 219 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Testimony from Gary Gustafson Regarding Irrelevant Disputes with Spectralytics, 212 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence, Argument, and Testimony Relating to Non-Corroborated and Non-Prior Art Machines, 214 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Proposed Expert Testimony of Paul Brennan at Trial filed by Cordis Corporation. SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Merrill, Courtland) Modified text on 1/7/2009 (jdf). (Entered: 12/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 12/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 212 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence, Argument, and Testimony Relating to Non-Corroborated and Non-Prior Art Machines filed by Norman Noble, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Pulju, Lee) Modified on 1/5/2009 (MMP). (Entered: 12/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 12/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 212 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence, Argument, and Testimony Relating to Non-Corroborated and Non-Prior Art Machines Placeholder filed by Cordis Corporation. SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE(Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate, # 2 Affidavit of Service)(Merrill, Courtland) Modified text on 1/7/2009 (jdf). (Entered: 12/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 12/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 217 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence, Testimony and Argument Relating to Discussions, Decisions, or Investigations by Defendants, LPL and/or RMS into Obtaining a Patent Placeholder filed by Norman Noble, Inc., Cordis Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate, # 2 Affidavit of Service) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE (Merrill, Courtland) Modified text on 1/7/2009 (jdf). (Entered: 12/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 12/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 210 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Negotiations and Sale Price of Spectralytics Placeholder filed by Norman Noble, Inc., Cordis Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate, # 2 Affidavit of Service)SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE (Merrill, Courtland) Modified text on 1/7/2009 (jdf). (Entered: 12/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 12/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 219 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Testimony from Gary Gustafson Regarding Irrelevant Disputes with Spectralytics Placeholder filed by Norman Noble, Inc., Cordis Corporation. SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE(Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate, # 2 Affidavit of Service)(Merrill, Courtland) Modified text on 1/7/2009 (jdf). (Entered: 12/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 12/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 214 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Proposed Expert Testimony of Paul Brennan at Trial Placeholder filed by Cordis Corporation. SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate, # 2 Affidavit of Service)(Merrill, Courtland) Modified text on 1/7/2009 (jdf). (Entered: 12/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 12/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Kathleen M. Crotty by Cordis Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 12/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 12/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Spectralytics, Inc. re 199 Trial Brief, 210 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Negotiations and Sale Price of Spectralytics, 201 Witness List, 216 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 218 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 203 Proposed Voir Dire, 220 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 200 Exhibit List, 205 Proposed Witness List, 221 Declaration in Support, 217 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence, Testimony and Argument Relating to Discussions, Decisions, or Investigations by Defendants, LPL and/or RMS into Obtaining a Patent, 202 List of Deposition Testimony, 223 Notice of Hearing on Motion, 219 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Testimony from Gary Gustafson Regarding Irrelevant Disputes with Spectralytics, 208 Proposed Jury Instructions, 212 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence, Argument, and Testimony Relating to Non-Corroborated and Non-Prior Art Machines, 214 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Proposed Expert Testimony of Paul Brennan at Trial, 213 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 207 Proposed Special Verdict Form, 211 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 209 Proposed Jury Instructions (Bremer, Dennis) Modified on 1/5/2009 (MMP). (Entered: 12/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 12/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Courtland C. Merrill in Support of 179 MOTION in Limine No. 3, 169 MOTION in Limine No. 2, 167 MOTION in Limine No. 1, 182 MOTION in Limine No. 4, 188 MOTION in Limine No. 5 filed by Cordis Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 12/29/08 (Merrill, Courtland) Modified text on 12/30/2008 (jdf). (Entered: 12/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 12/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LR7.1 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Cordis Corporation re 189 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Cordis Corporation. (Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 12/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 12/26/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 217 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence, Testimony and Argument Relating to Discussions, Decisions, or Investigations by Defendants, LPL and/or RMS into Obtaining a Patent, 219 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Testimony from Gary Gustafson Regarding Irrelevant Disputes with Spectralytics, 210 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Negotiations and Sale Price of Spectralytics, 214 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Proposed Expert Testimony of Paul Brennan at Trial, 212 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence, Argument, and Testimony Relating to Non-Corroborated and Non-Prior Art Machines : Motion Hearing set for 1/9/2009 09:00 AM in St. Paul - Courtroom 7B before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Bremer, Dennis) (Entered: 12/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 12/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LR7.1 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Cordis Corporation re 184 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Cordis Corporation. (Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 12/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 12/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Matthew J. Goggin in Support of 210 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Negotiations and Sale Price of Spectralytics, 217 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence, Testimony and Argument Relating to Discussions, Decisions, or Investigations by Defendants, LPL and/or RMS into Obtaining a Patent, 219 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Testimony from Gary Gustafson Regarding Irrelevant Disputes with Spectralytics, 212 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence, Argument, and Testimony Relating to Non-Corroborated and Non-Prior Art Machines, 214 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Proposed Expert Testimony of Paul Brennan at Trial filed by Spectralytics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-34 (PLACEHOLDER))(Bremer, Dennis) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE Modified text on 12/29/2008 (jdf). (Entered: 12/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 12/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re 219 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Testimony from Gary Gustafson Regarding Irrelevant Disputes with Spectralytics filed by Spectralytics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Bremer, Dennis) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE Modified text on 12/29/2008 (jdf). (Entered: 12/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 12/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION in Limine to Preclude Testimony from Gary Gustafson Regarding Irrelevant Disputes with Spectralytics by Spectralytics, Inc.. (Bremer, Dennis) (Entered: 12/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 12/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re 217 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence, Testimony and Argument Relating to Discussions, Decisions, or Investigations by Defendants, LPL and/or RMS into Obtaining a Patent filed by Spectralytics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Bremer, Dennis) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE Modified text on 12/29/2008 (jdf). (Entered: 12/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 12/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence, Testimony and Argument Relating to Discussions, Decisions, or Investigations by Defendants, LPL and/or RMS into Obtaining a Patent by Spectralytics, Inc.. (Bremer, Dennis) (Entered: 12/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 12/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re 214 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Proposed Expert Testimony of Paul Brennan at Trial filed by Spectralytics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Bremer, Dennis)SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE Modified text on 12/29/2008 (jdf). (Entered: 12/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 12/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LR7.1 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Cordis Corporation re 180 Memorandum filed by Cordis Corporation. (Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 12/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 12/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Proposed Expert Testimony of Paul Brennan at Trial by Spectralytics, Inc.. (Bremer, Dennis) (Entered: 12/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 12/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re 212 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence, Argument, and Testimony Relating to Non-Corroborated and Non-Prior Art Machines filed by Spectralytics, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Bremer, Dennis) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE Modified text on 12/29/2008 (jdf). (Entered: 12/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 12/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine to Preclude Evidence, Argument, and Testimony Relating to Non-Corroborated and Non-Prior Art Machines by Spectralytics, Inc.. (Bremer, Dennis) (Entered: 12/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 12/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re 210 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Negotiations and Sale Price of Spectralytics filed by Spectralytics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Bremer, Dennis)SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE Modified text on 12/29/2008 (jdf). (Entered: 12/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 12/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Negotiations and Sale Price of Spectralytics by Spectralytics, Inc.. (Bremer, Dennis) (Entered: 12/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 12/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Jury Instructions submitted by Norman Noble, Inc., Spectralytics, Inc., Cordis Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Bremer, Dennis) (Entered: 12/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 12/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Jury Instructions submitted by Norman Noble, Inc., Spectralytics, Inc., Cordis Corporation. (Bremer, Dennis) (Entered: 12/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 12/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Special Verdict Form by Spectralytics, Inc.. (Bremer, Dennis) (Entered: 12/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 12/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LR7.1 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Cordis Corporation re 170 Memorandum filed by Cordis Corporation. (Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 12/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 12/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Witness List (Joint List of Parties, Attorneys, and Witnesses by Norman Noble, Inc., Spectralytics, Inc., Cordis Corporation. (Bremer, Dennis) (Entered: 12/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 12/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint STATEMENT OF CASE as to Norman Noble, Inc., Spectralytics, Inc., Cordis Corporation. (Bremer, Dennis) (Entered: 12/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 12/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Voir Dire by Spectralytics, Inc.. (Bremer, Dennis) (Entered: 12/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 12/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      List of Deposition Testimony (Deposition designations and objections) submitted by Spectralytics, Inc.. (Bremer, Dennis) (Entered: 12/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 12/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Witness List by Spectralytics, Inc.. (Bremer, Dennis) (Entered: 12/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 12/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Exhibit List by Spectralytics, Inc.. (Bremer, Dennis) (Entered: 12/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 12/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRIAL BRIEF (PLACEHOLDER) by Spectralytics, Inc. (Bremer, Dennis)SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE Modified text on 12/29/2008 (jdf). (Entered: 12/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 12/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LR7.1 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Cordis Corporation re 168 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Cordis Corporation. (Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 12/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 12/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Voir Dire by Norman Noble, Inc., Cordis Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 12/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 12/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Special Verdict Form by Norman Noble, Inc., Cordis Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 12/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 12/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    List of Deposition Testimony submitted by Norman Noble, Inc., Cordis Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 12/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 12/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Witness List by Norman Noble, Inc., Cordis Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 12/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 12/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Exhibit List by Norman Noble, Inc., Cordis Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 12/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 12/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRIAL BRIEF by Cordis Corporation. SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 12/29/08 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Merrill, Courtland) Modified text on 12/30/2008 (jdf). (Entered: 12/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 12/26/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 167 MOTION in Limine No. 1, 169 MOTION in Limine No. 2, 179 MOTION in Limine No. 3, 182 MOTION in Limine No. 4, 188 MOTION in Limine No. 5 : Motion Hearing set for 1/9/2009 09:00 AM in St. Paul - Courtroom 7B before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 12/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 12/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRIAL BRIEF Placeholder by Norman Noble, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Pulju, Lee) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 12/29/08. (KT) (Entered: 12/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 12/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re 188 MOTION in Limine No. 5 Placeholder filed by Cordis Corporation. SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 12/29/08 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Merrill, Courtland) Modified text on 12/30/2008 (jdf). (Entered: 12/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 12/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine No. 5 by Cordis Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 12/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 12/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Norman Noble, Inc. re 173 MOTION in Limine No. 2, 183 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 185 Declaration in Support, 178 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 175 MOTION in Limine No. 3, 174 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 186 Notice of Hearing on Motion, 171 MOTION in Limine No. 1, 177 MOTION in Limine No. 4, 181 MOTION in Limine No. 5, 172 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 176 Memorandum in Support of Motion (Pulju, Lee) (Entered: 12/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 12/26/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 177 MOTION in Limine No. 4, 181 MOTION in Limine No. 5, 171 MOTION in Limine No. 1, 175 MOTION in Limine No. 3, 173 MOTION in Limine No. 2 : Motion Hearing set for 1/9/2009 09:00 AM in St. Paul - Courtroom 7B before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Pulju, Lee) (Entered: 12/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 12/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of James B. Niehaus in Support of 173 MOTION in Limine No. 2, 183 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 178 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 175 MOTION in Limine No. 3, 174 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 171 MOTION in Limine No. 1, 177 MOTION in Limine No. 4, 181 MOTION in Limine No. 5, 172 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 176 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Norman Noble, Inc.. (Pulju, Lee) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 12/29/08. (KT) (Entered: 12/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 12/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re 182 MOTION in Limine No. 4 Placeholder filed by Cordis Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Merrill, Courtland) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 12/29/08. Modified text on 12/30/2008 (jdf). (Entered: 12/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 12/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support re 181 MOTION in Limine No. 5 filed by Norman Noble, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Pulju, Lee) (Entered: 12/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 12/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION in Limine No. 4 by Cordis Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 12/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 12/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION in Limine No. 5 by Norman Noble, Inc.. (Pulju, Lee) (Entered: 12/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 12/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM by Cordis Corporation re 179 MOTION in Limine No. 3 Placeholder filed by Cordis Corporation. SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 12/29/08(Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Merrill, Courtland) Modified text on 12/30/2008 (jdf). (Entered: 12/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 12/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION in Limine No. 3 by Cordis Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 12/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 12/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re 177 MOTION in Limine No. 4 Placeholder filed by Norman Noble, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Pulju, Lee) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 12/29/08. (KT) (Entered: 12/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 12/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION in Limine No. 4 by Norman Noble, Inc.. (Pulju, Lee) (Entered: 12/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 12/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re 175 MOTION in Limine No. 3 filed by Norman Noble, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Pulju, Lee) (Entered: 12/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 12/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION in Limine No. 3 by Norman Noble, Inc.. (Pulju, Lee) (Entered: 12/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 12/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re 173 MOTION in Limine No. 2 filed by Norman Noble, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Pulju, Lee) (Entered: 12/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 12/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION in Limine No. 2 by Norman Noble, Inc.. (Pulju, Lee) (Entered: 12/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 12/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re 171 MOTION in Limine No. 1 filed by Norman Noble, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Pulju, Lee) (Entered: 12/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 12/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION in Limine No. 1 by Norman Noble, Inc.. (Pulju, Lee) (Entered: 12/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 12/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM by Cordis Corporation re 169 MOTION in Limine No. 2 Placeholder filed by Cordis Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Merrill, Courtland) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 12/29/08 Modified on 12/30/2008 (jdf). (Entered: 12/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 12/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION in Limine No. 2 by Cordis Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 12/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 12/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re 167 MOTION in Limine No. 1 Placeholder filed by Cordis Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Merrill, Courtland) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 12/29/08. Modified on 12/30/2008 (jdf). (Entered: 12/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 12/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION in Limine No. 1 by Cordis Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 12/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Stipulated Motion Concerning Pre-Trial Submissions [Civil Docket No. 165 ] is DENIED. The parties must comply with all of the deadlines set forth in the Trial Notice and Final Pretrial Order of September 17, 2008.Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 12/12/08. (sf) (Entered: 12/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 152 Notice of Hearing, Regarding Pre-Trial Submissions by Spectralytics, Inc., Cordis Corporation, and Norman Noble, Inc. (Bremer, Dennis) Modified on 12/12/2008 (MMP). (Entered: 12/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 12/3/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER TO COUNSEL - Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 12/03/08. (bjs) (Entered: 12/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 12/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Cordis Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 12/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 12/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Norman Noble, Inc.. (Niehaus, James) (Entered: 12/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 11/20/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Mag. Judge Raymond L. Erickson: Settlement Conference held on 11/20/2008. No settlement reached. (jz) (Entered: 11/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 11/13/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED ORDER That the Settlement Conference set for November 18, 2008, is reset to 1:30 p.m., on Tuesday, November 18, 2008, before Chief Magistrate Judge Raymond L. Erickson, in Court Room No. 3A, Warren E. Burger Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 316 N. Robert St., St. Paul, Minnesota. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Raymond L. Erickson on 11/13/2008. (jz) (Entered: 11/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 11/12/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER That the Settlement Conference set for January 24, 2008, is reset to 1:30 p.m., on Tuesday, November 18, 2008, before Chief Magistrate Judge Raymond L. Erickson, in Court Room No. 3A, Warren E. Burger Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 316 N. Robert St., St. Paul, Minnesota. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Raymond L. Erickson on 11/12/2008. (jz) (Entered: 11/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 10/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER TO CLERK'S OFFICE from Courtland C. Merrill. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 10/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 9/29/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER Settlement Conference set for 11/18/2008 10:00 AM in St Paul - Courtroom 3A before Chief Mag. Judge Raymond L. Erickson. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Raymond L. Erickson on 09/29/2008. (jz) (Entered: 09/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 9/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Aron Fischer by Cordis Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 09/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 9/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Jesse A. Devine by Cordis Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 09/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 9/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Robert W. Lehrburger by Cordis Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 09/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 9/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Kathleen M. Crotty by Cordis Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 09/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 9/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JURY TRIAL NOTICE AND FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER. Jury Trial set for 1/13/2009 09:00 AM in St. Paul - Courtroom 7B before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. Pretrial Conference set for 1/9/09 9:00 AM in St. Paul - Courtroom 7B before Patrick J. Schiltz. See Order for other deadlines.(sf) (Entered: 09/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting in part and denying in part 88 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 93 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 103 Motion for Summary Judgment. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 09/15/08.(bjs) (Entered: 09/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Cordis Corporation of Removal of Attorney Anjan Mishra (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 08/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Cordis Corporation of Removal of Attorney Richard O. Jackson (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 08/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney for Deakin T. Lauer (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Rigby, Russell) (Entered: 08/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 2/26/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Civil Motion Hearing held on 11/26/07 before Judge Patrick J Schiltz. Court Reporter: Debra Beauvais. (192pgs) FILED CONVENTIONALLY (jdf) (Entered: 02/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Spectralytics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Goggin, Matthew) (Entered: 12/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz: Motion Hearing held on 11/26/2007 re 103 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Cordis Corporation, 88 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Norman Noble, Inc., 93 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Spectralytics, Inc. Matter taken under advisement. Written order will issue. (Court Reporter Debra Beauvais) (sf) (Entered: 11/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Spectralytics, Inc. re 142 Reply, 143 Declaration in Support (Goggin, Matthew) (Entered: 10/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Matthew J. Goggin in Support of 142 Reply filed by Spectralytics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Placeholder for Exs 1 - 4)(Goggin, Matthew) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 10/15/07. (KT) (Entered: 10/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY re 93 MOTION for Summary Judgment Placeholder for Memorandum filed by Spectralytics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Goggin, Matthew) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 10/15/07. (KT) (Entered: 10/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cordis Corporation re 139 Reply, 140 Declaration in Support (Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 10/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Third Declaration of Courtland C. Merrill in Support of 103 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Cordis Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Placeholder for Exhibits 72-76)(Merrill, Courtland) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 10/15/07. (KT) (Entered: 10/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY re 103 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Cordis Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Merrill, Courtland) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 10/15/07. (KT) (Entered: 10/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Norman Noble, Inc. re 137 Declaration in Support, 136 Reply (Pulju, Lee) (Entered: 10/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Christopher C. Koehler in Support of 136 Reply filed by Norman Noble, Inc.. (Pulju, Lee) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 10/15/07. (KT) (Entered: 10/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY re 88 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Norman Noble, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Pulju, Lee) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 10/15/07. (KT) (Entered: 10/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 96 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 10/15/07. (bjs) (Entered: 10/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Spectralytics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Bremer, Dennis) (Entered: 10/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Spectralytics, Inc. re 131 Declaration in Support, 123 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 132 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate (Goggin, Matthew) (Entered: 10/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LR7.1 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Spectralytics, Inc. re 123 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Spectralytics, Inc.. (Goggin, Matthew) (Entered: 10/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Matthew J. Goggin in Support of 123 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Spectralytics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) # 2 Exhibit(s) # 3 Exhibit(s) # 4 Exhibit(s) # 5 Exhibit(s) # 6 Exhibit(s) # 7 Exhibit(s) # 8 Exhibit(s) # 9 Exhibit(s))(Goggin, Matthew) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 10/5/07. (KT) (Entered: 10/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Spectralytics, Inc. re 125 Declaration in Support, 124 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 126 Declaration in Support, 128 Declaration in Support, 129 Declaration in Support, 127 Declaration in Support (Bremer, Dennis) (Entered: 10/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Mark Goemer in Support of 124 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Spectralytics, Inc.. (Bremer, Dennis) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 10/5/07. (KT) (Entered: 10/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of James Miller in Support of 124 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Spectralytics, Inc.. (Bremer, Dennis) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 10/5/07. (KT) (Entered: 10/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Gary Oberg in Support of 124 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Spectralytics, Inc.. (Bremer, Dennis) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 10/5/07. (KT) (Entered: 10/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Bruce Allen in Support of 124 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Spectralytics, Inc.. (Bremer, Dennis) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 10/5/07. (KT) (Entered: 10/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Dennis C. Bremer in Support of 124 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Spectralytics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Placeholder for Exhibits 1-44# 2 Placeholder for Exhibits 45 and 46)(Bremer, Dennis) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 10/5/07. (KT) (Entered: 10/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 88 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Spectralytics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Bremer, Dennis) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 10/5/07. (KT) (Entered: 10/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 103 MOTION for Summary Judgment Placeholder for Memorandum filed by Spectralytics, Inc.. (Goggin, Matthew) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 10/5/07. (KT) (Entered: 10/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cordis Corporation re 120 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 121 Declaration in Opposition (Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 10/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Courtland C. Merrill (Filed Under Seal) in Opposition to 93 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Cordis Corporation. (Merrill, Courtland) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 10/5/07. (KT) (Entered: 10/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 93 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Cordis Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Merrill, Courtland) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 10/5/07. (KT) (Entered: 10/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Norman Noble, Inc. re 117 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 118 Declaration in Support (Pulju, Lee) (Entered: 10/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Christopher C. Koehler in Support of 117 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Norman Noble, Inc.. (Pulju, Lee) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 10/5/07. (KT) (Entered: 10/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 93 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Norman Noble, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Pulju, Lee) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 10/5/07. (KT) (Entered: 10/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Spectralytics, Inc. re 114 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate, 113 Exhibit, 99 Declaration in Support, 101 Declaration in Support, 94 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 95 Declaration in Support, 104 Declaration in Support, 93 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 105 Declaration in Support, 115 Notice of Hearing on Motion (Goggin, Matthew) (Entered: 09/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 93 MOTION for Summary Judgment : Motion Hearing set for 10/25/2007 09:00 AM in St Paul - Courtroom 4 before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Goggin, Matthew) (Entered: 09/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LR7.1 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Spectralytics, Inc. re 94 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Spectralytics, Inc.. (Goggin, Matthew) (Entered: 09/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EXHIBIT re 95 Declaration in Support, by Spectralytics, Inc. filed by Spectralytics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exh 2# 2 Ex. 3# 3 Ex. 4# 4 Ex. 5# 5 Ex 6# 6 Ex. 7# 7 Ex. 8# 8 Ex. 9# 9 Ex. 10# 10 Ex. 11# 11 Ex. 46# 12 Ex. 50)(Goggin, Matthew) (Entered: 09/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cordis Corporation re 108 Declaration in Support, 110 Declaration in Support, 109 Declaration in Support, 107 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 111 Declaration in Support, 103 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 106 Notice of Hearing on Motion (Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 09/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Paul Brennan in Support of 103 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Cordis Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A-D)(Merrill, Courtland) SEALED DOUCMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 9/10/07. (KT) (Entered: 09/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Paul H. Huber in Support of 103 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Cordis Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A)(Merrill, Courtland) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 9/10/07. (KT) (Entered: 09/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of William P. Dobbins in Support of 103 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Cordis Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A)(Merrill, Courtland) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 9/10/07. (KT) (Entered: 09/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Courtland C. Merrill in Support of 103 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Cordis Corporation. (Merrill, Courtland) SEALED DOUCMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 9/10/07. (KT) (Entered: 09/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re 103 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Cordis Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Merrill, Courtland) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 9/10/07. (KT) (Entered: 09/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 103 MOTION for Summary Judgment : Motion Hearing set for 10/25/2007 09:00 AM in St Paul - Courtroom 4 before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 09/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Samuel Phillips in Support of 94 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 93 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Spectralytics, Inc.. (Goggin, Matthew) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 9/11/07. (KT) (Entered: 09/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Larry Nixon in Support of 94 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 93 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Spectralytics, Inc.. (Goggin, Matthew) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 9/11/07. (KT) (Entered: 09/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Summary Judgment by Cordis Corporation. (Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 09/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cordis Corporation re 96 MOTION in Limine Daubert Motion to Exclude the Trial Testimony of Plaintiff's Patent Law Expert Larry Nixon, 100 Declaration in Support, 97 Notice of Hearing on Motion, 98 Memorandum in Support of Motion, (Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 09/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Mazumder in Support of 94 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 93 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Spectralytics, Inc.. (Goggin, Matthew) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 9/11/07. (KT) (Entered: 09/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Courtland C. Merrill in Support of 96 MOTION in Limine Daubert Motion to Exclude the Trial Testimony of Plaintiff's Patent Law Expert Larry Nixon filed by Cordis Corporation. (Merrill, Courtland) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 9/10/07. (KT) (Entered: 09/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Patrick Madsen in Support of 94 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 93 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Spectralytics, Inc.. (Goggin, Matthew) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 9/11/07. (KT) (Entered: 09/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re 96 MOTION in Limine Daubert Motion to Exclude the Trial Testimony of Plaintiff's Patent Law Expert Larry Nixon filed by Cordis Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Merrill, Courtland) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 9/10/07. (KT) (Entered: 09/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 96 MOTION in Limine Daubert Motion to Exclude the Trial Testimony of Plaintiff's Patent Law Expert Larry Nixon : Motion Hearing set for 10/25/2007 09:00 AM in St Paul - Courtroom 4 before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 09/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION in Limine Daubert Motion to Exclude the Trial Testimony of Plaintiff's Patent Law Expert Larry Nixon by Cordis Corporation. (Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 09/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Russell J. Rigby in Support of 94 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 93 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Spectralytics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhs. 12-25 Placeholder# 2 Exhs. 26 to 45 Placeholder# 3 Exhs. 47 to 49 Placeholder# 4 Exhs. 51 to 68 Placeholder# 5 Exhs. 69 to 87 Placeholder# 6 Exhs. 88 - 99 Placeholder# 7 Exhs. 100 - 121 Placeholder# 8 Exhs. 122-127 Placeholder# 9 Exhs. 128 - 131 Placeholder)(Goggin, Matthew) SEALED DOCUMENTS RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 9/11/07. (KT) (Entered: 09/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re 93 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Placeholder -- filed Under Seal) filed by Spectralytics, Inc.. (Goggin, Matthew) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 9/11/07. (KT) (Entered: 09/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Summary Judgment by Spectralytics, Inc.. (Goggin, Matthew) (Entered: 09/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Norman Noble, Inc. re 89 Notice of Hearing on Motion, 91 Declaration in Support, 90 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 88 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Pulju, Lee) (Entered: 09/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of James B. Niehaus in Support of 88 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Norman Noble, Inc.. (Pulju, Lee) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 9/10/07. (KT) (Entered: 09/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re 88 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Norman Noble, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Pulju, Lee) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 9/10/07. (KT) (Entered: 09/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 88 MOTION for Summary Judgment : Motion Hearing set for 10/25/2007 09:00 AM in St Paul - Courtroom 4 before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Pulju, Lee) (Entered: 09/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Summary Judgment by Norman Noble, Inc.. (Pulju, Lee) (Entered: 09/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Anjan Mishra by Cordis Corporation. (Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 08/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re 85 Stipulation filed by Cordis Corporation, Spectralytics, Inc., 76 MOTION to Compel Cordis Corp. to Produce Fully Prepared 30(b)(6) Designees and Withheld Documents filed by Spectralytics, Inc., . Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Raymond L. Erickson on 7/9/07. (JMH) (Entered: 07/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION re 76 MOTION to Compel Cordis Corp. to Produce Fully Prepared 30(b)(6) Designees and Withheld Documents by Cordis Corporation, and Spectralytics, Inc. (Merrill, Courtland) Modified on 7/6/2007 (gjs). (Entered: 07/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 6/26/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER Settlement Conference set for 8/14/2007 10:00 AM in Duluth - Courtroom 3 before Chief Mag. Judge Raymond L. Erickson. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Raymond L. Erickson on 06/26/2007. (jc) (Entered: 06/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL FROM CASE by Cordis Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 06/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 6/12/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER That the Settlement Conference set for Wednesday, June 27, 2007, at 10:00 a.m., in Court Room 14W, Minneapolis, Minnesota, is stricken from this Court's calendar. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Raymond L. Erickson on 06/12/2007. (jc) (Entered: 06/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Spectralytics, Inc. re 77 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 79 Declaration in Support,,, 78 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate, 76 MOTION to Compel Cordis Corp. to Produce Fully Prepared 30(b)(6) Designees and Withheld Documents, 80 Notice of Hearing on Motion, (Goggin, Matthew) (Entered: 06/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 76 MOTION to Compel Cordis Corp. to Produce Fully Prepared 30(b)(6) Designees and Withheld Documents: Motion Hearing set for 7/11/2007 09:00 AM in Minneapolis - Courtroom 13W before Chief Mag. Judge Raymond L. Erickson. (Goggin, Matthew) (Entered: 06/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Matthew J. Goggin in Support of 77 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 76 MOTION to Compel Cordis Corp. to Produce Fully Prepared 30(b)(6) Designees and Withheld Documents filed by Spectralytics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Placeholder)# 2 Exhibit 2 (Placeholder)# 3 Exhibit 3 (Placeholder)# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8 (Placeholder)# 9 Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit 10# 11 Exhibit 11 (Placeholder)# 12 Exhibit 12# 13 Exhibit 13# 14 Exhibit 14# 15 Exhibit 15# 16 Exhibit 16# 17 Exhibit 17# 18 Exhibit 18# 19 Exhibit 19# 20 Exhibit 20# 21 Exhibit 21# 22 Exhibit 22)(Goggin, Matthew)RECEIVED SEALED DOCUMENTS ON 6/8/07 Modified on 6/11/2007 (GJS). (Entered: 06/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LR7.1 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Spectralytics, Inc. re 77 Memorandum in Support of Motion. (Goggin, Matthew) (Entered: 06/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re 76 MOTION to Compel Cordis Corp. to Produce Fully Prepared 30(b)(6) Designees and Withheld Documents Placeholder filed by Spectralytics, Inc.. (Goggin, Matthew) RECEIVED SEALED DOCUMENT ON 6/11/07 Modified on 6/11/2007 (GJS). (Entered: 06/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Compel Cordis Corp. to Produce Fully Prepared 30(b)(6) Designees and Withheld Documents by Spectralytics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Compliance with LR 37.1)(Goggin, Matthew) (Entered: 06/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER Settlement Conference set for 6/27/2007 10:00 AM in Minneapolis - Courtroom 14W before Chief Mag. Judge Raymond L. Erickson. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Raymond L. Erickson on 06/27/2007. (jc) (Entered: 06/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 5/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LR7.1 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Norman Noble, Inc. re 67 Response filed by Norman Noble, Inc.. (Pulju, Lee) (Entered: 05/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/10/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER granting 53 Motion to Amend the Pretrial Schedule. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Raymond L. Erickson on 5/10/07. (JMH) (Entered: 05/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Raymond L. Erickson : Motion Hearing held on 5/8/2007 re 53 MOTION to Amend/Correct 47 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines. Motions taken under advisement as of May 8, 2007. Order to be issued. (Court Reporter Dawn Hansen) (jc) (Entered: 05/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cordis Corporation re 70 Declaration in Opposition,, 69 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion (Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 05/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Courtland C. Merrill in Opposition to 53 MOTION to Amend/Correct 47 Order filed by Cordis Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A-C# 2 Placeholder for Exhibit D)(Merrill, Courtland) Modified text on 5/2/2007 (akl). SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 5/1/2007. (KT) (Entered: 05/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 53 MOTION to Amend/Correct 47 Order filed by Cordis Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Merrill, Courtland) Modified text on 5/2/2007 (akl). (Entered: 05/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Norman Noble, Inc. re 67 Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Pretrial Scheduling Order (Telephonic Attendance at Hearing Requested) (Niehaus, James) (Entered: 05/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE re 53 MOTION to Amend/Correct 47 Order (Telephonic Attendance at Hearing Requested) filed by Norman Noble, Inc.. (Niehaus, James) Modified text on 5/2/2007 (akl). (Entered: 05/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 4/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Spectralytics, Inc. re 64 Exhibit, 65 Exhibit, 63 Declaration in Support, (Goggin, Matthew) (Entered: 04/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        EXHIBIT re 63 Declaration in Support, Placeholder for Exhibit 10 by Spectralytics, Inc. filed by Spectralytics, Inc.. (Goggin, Matthew) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 4/25/07. (KT) (Entered: 04/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBIT re 63 Declaration in Support, Placeholder for Exhibit 7 by Spectralytics, Inc. filed by Spectralytics, Inc.. (Goggin, Matthew) SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 4/25/07. (KT) (Entered: 04/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Matthew J. Goggin in Support of 53 MOTION to Amend/Correct 47 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, filed by Spectralytics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 # 2 Exhibit 2) # 3 Exhibit 3 # 4 Exhibit 4 # 5 Exhibit 5 # 6 Exhibit 6 # 7 Exhibit 7 #8) Exhibit8))(Goggin, Matthew) Modified on 4/26/2007 (gjs). (Entered: 04/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Spectralytics, Inc. re 61 Declaration in Support (Bremer, Dennis) (Entered: 04/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Supplemental Declaration of Dennis C. Bremer in Support of 53 MOTION to Amend/Correct 47 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, filed by Spectralytics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) # 2 Exhibit(s))(Bremer, Dennis) Modified on 4/26/2007 (gjs). (Entered: 04/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by R J Zayed on behalf of Spectralytics, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Zayed, R) (Entered: 04/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cordis Corporation re 57 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Rosa E. Son, 58 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Irene Choi (Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 04/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Irene Choi by Cordis Corporation. (Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 04/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Rosa E. Son by Cordis Corporation. (Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 04/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Spectralytics, Inc. re 55 Notice of Hearing on Motion (Goggin, Matthew) (Entered: 04/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 53 MOTION to Amend/Correct 47 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines: Motion Hearing set for 5/8/2007 03:30 PM in Minneapolis - Courtroom 9E before Chief Mag. Judge Raymond L. Erickson. (Goggin, Matthew) Modified on 4/18/2007 (gjs). (Entered: 04/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Spectralytics, Inc. re 53 MOTION to Amend/Correct 47 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines,,,,,, (Goggin, Matthew) (Entered: 04/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Amend/Correct 47 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, by Spectralytics, Inc. (Goggin, Matthew) Modified text on 4/18/2007 (gjs). (Entered: 04/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/8/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER That the parties' Joint Motion to Amend Pretrial Scheduling Order Docket No. 51 is DENIED. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Raymond L. Erickson on 3/8/07. (JMH) (Entered: 03/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 18 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines by Spectralytics, Inc.. (Goggin, Matthew) (Entered: 03/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/27/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER That the Plaintiff's informal Motion for a Protective Order is DENIED. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Raymond L. Erickson on 2/27/07. (JMH) (Entered: 02/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/27/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Raymond L. Erickson : Informal Motion for Protective Order/Compel Deposition Testimony held on 2/27/2007. (Tape #7-11) (JMH) (Entered: 02/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Christopher C. Koehler by Norman Noble, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Pulju, Lee) (Entered: 02/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/18/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER That the Stipulated Motion To Amend Pretrial Scheduling Order 46 is GRANTED, and this Court's Pretrial Scheduling Order, dated February 15, 2006, is amended as follows: 1. That all fact discovery shall be commenced in time to be completed by May 1, 2007. 2. That disclosure of the identity of expert witnesses under Rule 26(a)(2)(A) shall be made on or before May 1, 2007, with respect to initial experts. 3. That full disclosure of the substance of the testimony to be offered by each expert witness shall be made by all parties on or before June 1, 2007, with respect to initial expert reports, and by all parties on or before July 1, 2007, with respect to rebuttal expert reports. Discovery due by 5/1/2007. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Raymond L. Erickson on 1/18/07. (JMH) (Entered: 01/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 18 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines by Cordis Corporation. (Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 01/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/30/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF Joint filed by Norman Noble, Inc., Spectralytics, Inc., Cordis Corporation. (Bremer, Dennis) (Entered: 11/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/19/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Raymond L Erickson on 10/18/06. (SEA) (Entered: 10/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/18/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER AMENDING PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER On or before November 30, 2006, the parties shall file a joint claim construction statement that conforms to the agreement set forth at paragraph (f)(4) of their Rule 26(f) report. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Raymond L Erickson on 10/18/06. (JMH) Modified on 10/19/2006 (JMH). (Entered: 10/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/18/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION for Protective Order by Cordis Corporation. (Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 10/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 18 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines by Norman Noble, Inc., Spectralytics, Inc., Cordis Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Bremer, Dennis) (Entered: 10/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING EXTENTION OF TIME FOR NORMAN NOBLE, INC. TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT Defendant Norman Noble, Inc., shall have until September 6, 2006, to respond to Plaintiff Spectralytics, Inc.'s First Amended Complaint.Signed by Magistrate Raymond L Erickson on 08/29/2006. (jc) (Entered: 09/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Norman Noble, Inc. re 38 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement, 37 Answer to Amended Complaint (Pulju, Lee) (Entered: 09/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Norman Noble, Inc. that there is no such parent or publicly held corporation to report. (Pulju, Lee) (Entered: 09/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Norman Noble, Inc..(Pulju, Lee) (Entered: 09/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Norman Noble, Inc. re 35 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Julie R. Fenstermaker, 34 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for James B. Niehaus (Pulju, Lee) (Entered: 09/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Julie R. Fenstermaker by Norman Noble, Inc.. (Pulju, Lee) (Entered: 09/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for James B. Niehaus by Norman Noble, Inc.. (Pulju, Lee) (Entered: 09/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/5/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Plaintiff's REPLY to Counterclaim of Cordis Corporation by Spectralytics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Bremer, Dennis) (Entered: 09/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION To Extend Time for Norman Noble Inc. to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Norman Noble, Inc., Spectralytics, Inc., Cordis Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Bremer, Dennis) (Entered: 08/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to First Amended Complaint and COUNTERCLAIM against Spectralytics, Inc by Cordis Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Merrill, Courtland) Modified text on 8/18/2006 (KT). (Entered: 08/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/3/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT against Norman Noble, Inc., Cordis Corporation, filed by Spectralytics, Inc..(Bremer, Dennis) (Entered: 08/03/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER That the Stipulated Motion to Amend the Complaint [Docket No. 28] isapproved, that the Plaintiff shall file and served its First Amended Complaint by no later thantwenty (20) days after this Order is filed. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Raymond L Erickson on 8/2/06. (JMH) (Entered: 08/02/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/1/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint, by Spectralytics, Inc., Cordis Corporation. (Bremer, Dennis) (Entered: 08/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/26/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER AMENDING PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Raymond L Erickson on 7/26/06. (RJL) (Entered: 07/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/25/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 22 First MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint, Or in the Alternative to Consolidate Cases: Motion Hearing set for 8/8/2006 02:30 PM before Chief Mag. Judge Raymond L Erickson. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Bremer, Dennis) (Entered: 07/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/24/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Spectralytics, Inc. re 22 First MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint, Or in the Alternative to Consolidate Cases, 24 Declaration in Support, 23 Memorandum in Support of Motion (Bremer, Dennis) (Entered: 07/24/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/24/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          First Declaration of Dennis C. Bremer in Support of 22 First MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint, Or in the Alternative to Consolidate Cases filed by Spectralytics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A to C)(Bremer, Dennis) (Entered: 07/24/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/24/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support re 22 First MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint, Or in the Alternative to Consolidate Cases filed by Spectralytics, Inc.. (Bremer, Dennis) (Entered: 07/24/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/24/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              First MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint, Or in the Alternative to Consolidate Cases by Spectralytics, Inc.. (Bremer, Dennis) (Entered: 07/24/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Pretrial Scheduling Order by Spectralytics, Inc., Cordis Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Bremer, Dennis) (Entered: 07/21/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/28/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L Noel on 3/27/2006. (sb) (Entered: 03/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/22/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION for Protective Order by Spectralytics, Inc., Cordis Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Bremer, Dennis) (Entered: 03/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/15/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 8/7/2006. Discovery due by 4/1/2007. Motions (non-disp) due 8/1/2007. Motions (disp) due by 10/1/2007. Ready for trial due by 11/1/2007. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L Noel on 2/15/06. (akl) (Entered: 02/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/31/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Cordis Corporation, Spectralytics, Inc..(Merrill, Courtland) Modified filers and text on 2/2/2006 (akl). (Entered: 01/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Spectralytics, Inc. confirming initial pretrial conference has been rescheduled to February 7, 2006. (Bremer, Dennis) Modified text on 1/9/2006 (akl). (Entered: 01/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Spectralytics, Inc. re 14 Reply to Counterclaim (Bremer, Dennis) Modified text on 1/9/2006 (akl). (Entered: 01/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Counterclaim of Defendant Cordis Corporation by Spectralytics, Inc..(Bremer, Dennis) Modified text on 1/9/2006 (akl). (Entered: 01/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/30/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 2/3/2006 at 09:00 AM, In Chambers Hearing before Magistrate Judge Franklin L Noel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L Noel on 12/30/05. (akl) (Entered: 12/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/21/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cordis Corporation re 5 Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution, 6 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, 7 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement, 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Gregory L. Diskant, 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Michael J. Timmons, 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Richard O. Jackson, 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for William E. Craco (Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 12/21/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/21/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for William E. Craco by Cordis Corporation. (Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 12/21/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/21/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Richard O. Jackson by Cordis Corporation. (Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 12/21/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/21/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Michael J. Timmons by Cordis Corporation. (Merrill, Courtland) (Entered: 12/21/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 99 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?