Kloeckner v. Perez
Federal Civil Lawsuit Missouri Eastern District Court, Case No. 4:09-cv-00804
District Judge Donald J. Stohr, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 26, 2017 at 2:37 PM DT (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Caroline M. Kloeckner, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICES OF LARRY J STEIN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Larry J. Stein +1 703 599 8023 +1 703 424 7670 larrystein@ljslaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by PLEBAN AND PETRUSKA LAW, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lynette M. Petruska +1 314 645 6666 +1 314 645 7376 lpetruska@plebanlaw.com
No Logo CAROLYN M. KLOECKNER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Buckley Kolar LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Larry J. Stein lstein@buckleykolar.com

Toggle Switch Represented by PLEBAN AND PETRUSKA LAW, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lynette M. Petruska +1 314 645 6666 +1 314 645 7376 lpetruska@plebanlaw.com
v.
Chao, Elaine L. Chao, Elaine L., Defendant
Officially listed as "Elaine Chao"
Unknown Role, NORWEST CORP
Unknown Role, PROTECTIVE LIFE CORP
News Corporation Unknown Role, News Corporation
Unknown Role, New Newscorp LLC
Unknown Role, Virginia Holdco, Inc.
Unknown Role, Ingersoll-Rand plc

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen S. Davis +1 314 539 2200 +1 314 539 2777
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
No Logo Hilda L. Solis, Defendant
No Logo Seth D Harris, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nicholas P. Llewellyn +1 314 539 2200 +1 314 539 2777 nicholas.llewellyn@usdoj.gov
No Logo Thomas E Perez, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nicholas P. Llewellyn +1 314 539 2200 +1 314 539 2777 nicholas.llewellyn@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000e
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
  Entries (178) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None Abstract of Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None Abstract of Judgment
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None Bill of Costs Taxed
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None Memorandum & Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None Memorandum & Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: None Objection to Bill of Costs
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None Clarify
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 10/31/2014, Entered: None Objection to Bill of Costs
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None Bill of Costs
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None Deposition Receipt
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None
                          Deposition Receipt by Plaintiff Caroline M. Kloeckner.(MCB) (Entered: 10/14/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None
                              Exhibit Receipt by Plaintiff Caroline M. Kloeckner, Defendant Thomas E. Perez.(MCB) (Entered: 10/14/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None Clerk's Judgment (Case)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None
                                  CLERK'S JUDGMENT - Jury Verdict. This action came before the Court for a trial by jury. The issues have been tried and the jury has returned its verdict. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Plaintiff Caroline M. Kloeckner recover nothing from Defendant Thomas Perez on the claims of sex discrimination, hostile work environment, and retaliation, and the action be dismissed on the merits. (MCB) (Entered: 10/14/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None Jury Notes
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None
                                      Jury Notes Filed. (MCB) (Entered: 10/14/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None Jury Instructions
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None
                                          Court's Copy of Jury Instructions filed. (MCB) (Entered: 10/14/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None Jury Instructions
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None
                                              Jury copy of Jury Instructions filed. (MCB) (Entered: 10/14/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None Jury Verdict
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                  JURY VERDICT For: Defendant Thomas Perez Against: Caroline M. Kloeckner. On the sex discrimination claim of plaintiff Caroline Kloeckner, as submitted in Instruction No. 7 we find in favor of Defendant. On the hostile work environment claim of plaintiff Caroline Kloeckner, as submitted in Insruction No. 12 we find in favor of Defendant. On the retaliation claim of plaintiff Caroline Kloeckner, as submitted in Instruction NO. 16, we find in favor of Defendant. (MCB) (Entered: 10/14/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                      CLERKS Exhibit List as to Jury Trial. (MCB) (Entered: 10/14/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None Witness List
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                          CLERKS WITNESS LIST as to Jury Trial. (MCB) (Entered: 10/14/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None Jury Trial - Completed
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge E. Richard Webber: Jury Trial - Day Five completed on 10/10/2014. Defendant's evidence resumed and concluded. Plaintiff evidence in rebuttal commenced and concluded. Oral Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law at the close of all the evidence argued by counsel and is denied. Closing Arguments of counsel made. Jury charged and retires to consider its verdicts at 4:09 p.m. Verdicts returned at 5:45 p.m. On motion of the Court the jury is polled. Judgment entered accordingly this date. (Court Reporter:S. Moran.) (FTR Gold: No.) (MCB) (Entered: 10/14/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None Jury Trial - Resumed but not Concluded
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge E. Richard Webber: Jury Trial Day Four resumed but not concluded 10/9/2014. Plaintiff evidence resumed and concluded. Oral Motions for Judgment as a Matter of Law as close of plaintiff's case made/argued by defendant ans denied. (Court grants oral motion for leave to file written motions is granted.) Proceedings to continue Friday, October 10, 2014 at 8:30 a.m. (Court Reporter:S. Moran.) (FTR Gold: No.) (MCB) (Entered: 10/10/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: None Proposed Jury Instructions
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: None Jury Trial - Resumed but not Concluded
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        Docket Text ORDER: It has come to the Court's attention that Plaintiff's legal name in this matter has been misspelled. By agreement of all parties, the Clerk's Office shall change Plaintiff's name from Carolyn M. Kloeckner to Caroline M. Kloeckner and this corrected name shall be used on all future pleadings before this Court. So Ordered by Judge E. Richard Webber on 10/08/2014. (BABS) (Entered: 10/08/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: None Jury Trial - Resumed but not Concluded
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: None Jury Trial - Begun
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None Memorandum & Order
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: None Pretrial Conference - Final
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: None Objection to Pretrial
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          Docket Text ORDER: A Non-Consent to the Court's Pilot Project has been received by counsel. All proceedings in this matter will be held in Courtroom 17 South. So Ordered by Judge E. Richard Webber on 09/25/2014. (BABS) (Entered: 09/25/2014)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Objection to Pretrial
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None Proposed Jury Instructions
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        Docket Text ORDER: Motion for Extension of Time 121 is GRANTED. Objections to Pretrial Compliance and any Motions in Limine shall be filed no later than September 24, 2014. Responses to any Motions in Limine shall be filed no later than September 25, 2014, at 5:00 p.m. Final Pretrial Conference to be held on September 26, 2014, at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 17 South. So Ordered by Judge E. Richard Webber on 09/19/2014. (BABS) (Entered: 09/19/2014)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None Extension
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: None Deposition Designations
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Deposition Designations by Plaintiff CAROLYN M. KLOECKNER.. (Petruska, Lynette) (Entered: 09/15/2014)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: None Trial Brief
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: None Proposed Jury Instructions
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: None Witness List
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: None Stipulation of Uncontested Facts
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: None Trial Brief
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: None Witness List
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: None Deposition List
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      Docket Text ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference in this matter will be held on September 26, 2014, at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 17 South, not September 25th as previously scheduled. Jury Trial will commence on October 6, 2014, at 8:30 a.m. So Ordered by Judge E. Richard Webber on 09/08/2014. (BABS) (Entered: 09/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None Sealed Order
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 94 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Thomas E. Perez. (Llewellyn, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None Response to Statement of Material Facts
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Statement of Material Facts re 97 Statement of Material Facts,,, Defendant's Reply to Plaintiff's Response to DSUMF and Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Statements of Fact filed by Defendant Thomas E. Perez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit OO, # 2 Exhibit PP, # 3 Exhibit QQ, # 4 Exhibit RR)(Llewellyn, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text ORDER: Motion for Extension of Time 105 is GRANTED. Reply relating to pending Motion for Summary Judgment 94 shall be filed no later than July 24, 2014. So Ordered by Judge E. Richard Webber on 07/22/2014. (BABS) (Entered: 07/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 103 Memorandum in Opposition of Sealed Motion, 94 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 96 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 97 Statement of Material Facts,,, by Defendant Thomas E. Perez. (Llewellyn, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text ORDER: Motion for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation 102 is GRANTED. Response in Opposition 103 to pending Motion for Summary Judgment 94 is accepted for filing by this Court. So Ordered by Judge E. Richard Webber on 07/17/2014. (BABS) (Entered: 07/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition of Sealed Motion re 94 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff CAROLYN M. KLOECKNER. (Petruska, Lynette) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Plaintiff CAROLYN M. KLOECKNER. (Petruska, Lynette) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 101 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            SEALED Statement of Controverted Material Facts Making Summary Judgment Improper by Plaintiff CAROLYN M. KLOECKNER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8-a, # 9 Exhibit 8-b, # 10 Exhibit 8-c, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit 13, # 16 Exhibit 14, # 17 Exhibit 15, # 18 Exhibit 16, # 19 Exhibit 17, # 20 Exhibit 18, # 21 Exhibit 19, # 22 Exhibit 20, # 23 Exhibit 21, # 24 Exhibit 22, # 25 Exhibit 23, # 26 Exhibit 24, # 27 Exhibit 25, # 28 Exhibit 26, # 29 Exhibit 27, # 30 Exhibit 28, # 31 Exhibit 29, # 32 Exhibit 30, # 33 Exhibit 31, # 34 Exhibit 32, # 35 Exhibit 33, # 36 Exhibit 34, # 37 Exhibit 35, # 38 Exhibit 36, # 39 Exhibit 37-a, # 40 Exhibit 37-b, # 41 Exhibit 38, # 42 Exhibit 39, # 43 Exhibit 40, # 44 Exhibit 41, # 45 Exhibit 42, # 46 Exhibit 43, # 47 Exhibit 44, # 48 Exhibit 45)(Petruska, Lynette) Modified on 7/17/2014 (BRP). (Entered: 07/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text ORDER: Motion for Extension of Time 99 is GRANTED. Response to pending Motion for Summary Judgment 94 shall be filed no later than July 16, 2014. Any Reply shall be filed within seven (7)days, thereafter. So Ordered by Judge E. Richard Webber on 06/25/2014. (BABS) (Entered: 06/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 94 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff CAROLYN M. KLOECKNER. (Petruska, Lynette) (Entered: 06/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text ORDER: Defendant's Motion for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation 95 is GRANTED. Defendant's Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment 96 is accepted by the Court as filed, and will be considered in ruling on the Motion for Summary Judgment 94 . So Ordered by Judge E. Richard Webber on 06/12/2014. (AES) (Entered: 06/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    STATEMENT of Material Facts re 94 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Thomas E. Perez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y, # 26 Exhibit Z, # 27 Exhibit AA, # 28 Exhibit BB, # 29 Exhibit CC, # 30 Exhibit DD, # 31 Exhibit EE, # 32 Exhibit FF, # 33 Exhibit GG, # 34 Exhibit HH, # 35 Exhibit II, # 36 Exhibit JJ, # 37 Exhibit KK, # 38 Exhibit LL, # 39 Exhibit MM, # 40 Exhibit NN)(Llewellyn, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re 94 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Thomas E. Perez. (Llewellyn, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Defendant Thomas E. Perez. (Llewellyn, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Thomas E. Perez. (Llewellyn, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 87 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Plaintiff CAROLYN M. KLOECKNER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Carolyn Kloeckner's Second Motion to Compel Discovery and Supporting Brief [#87] is GRANTED, in part, and DENIED, in part, as set forth above. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on May 20, 2014. (MCB) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge E. Richard Webber: Motion Hearing held on 5/20/2014 re 87 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by CAROLYN M. KLOECKNER. Counsel appear in person. The Court hears arguments from counsel. The matter is taken under submission. Order to issue. The defendant makes an oral motion to extend the deadline to file dispositive motions by 14 days. The plaintiff does not object. The Court grants the motion. Dispositive motions due by June 11, 2014. (Dispositive Motions due by 6/11/2014.) (Court Reporter:D. Kriegshauser.) (FTR Gold: No.) (BRP) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text ORDER: The Court has received the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal 90 of Certain Claims. Plaintiff's age discrimination claim as set forth in her Complaint 1 is dismisssed. Claims of sex discrimination, disability discrimination, retaliation for engaging in protected activity, and the creation of a hostile work environment, remain pending. So Ordered by Judge E. Richard Webber on 05/19/2014. (BABS) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by CAROLYN M. KLOECKNER, Defendant Thomas E. Perez Joined by Defendant of Plaintiff's Age Discrimination Claim Only (Petruska, Lynette) Modified on 5/20/2014 (BRP). (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 87 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Defendant Thomas E. Perez. (Llewellyn, Nicholas) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text ORDER: In-Court Hearing on pending Motion to Compel 87 will be held on May 20, 2014, at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 10 South. Defendant's Response to said Motion shall be filed no later than May 16, 2014. So Ordered by Judge E. Richard Webber on 05/13/2014. (BABS) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Compel Discovery by Plaintiff CAROLYN M. KLOECKNER. (Petruska, Lynette) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 86 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (see order for details) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the discovery requests contained in Plaintiff Carolyn Kloeckner's Response to Court Order Dated March 25, 2014 [ECF No. 84 ] are GRANTED, in part, and DENIED, in part, as set forth above. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on 04/08/2014. (CBL) (Entered: 04/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE re 84 Report to Court Order Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Response to Court Order dated 3-25-2014 by Defendant Thomas E. Perez. (Llewellyn, Nicholas) Modified on 4/4/2014 (CBL). (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              REPORT TO COURT ORDER re 82 Memorandum & Order,,, by Plaintiff CAROLYN M. KLOECKNER. (Petruska, Lynette) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 83 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED Supplement to Memorandum and Order 82 . (Sent Lynette Petruska and Christian Alexander Natiello via U.S. Mail and Nicholas Llewellyn via inter-office mail this date.) (BRP) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery and Supporting Brief [ECF No. 77 ] is DENIED, in part, and GRANTED, in part. After in camera review, and in conjunction with this Memorandum and Order, the Court has provided a redacted, sealed version of the Office of Inspector General complaint filed against Plaintiff. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, within five days of the issuance of this Memorandum and Order, Plaintiff shall provide the Court with a narrowly defined discovery request, as described above, pertaining to the documents sought from the Kansas City Regional Office of the Employee Benefits Security Administration, United States Department of Labor. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court's Order Referring Case to Alternative Dispute Resolution [ECF No. 76 ] is hereby VACATED. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on March 25, 2014. (BRP) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge E. Richard Webber: Motion Hearing held on 3/25/2014 re 77 MOTION to Compel Discovery and Supporting Brief filed by CAROLYN M. KLOECKNER. The Court hears arguments from counsel. Counsel for defendant presents documents for In Camera Review. The Court takes the motion under submission. Counsel jointly request the Court to vacate the Order referring the case to Mediation. The Court vacates its Order Referring Case to Alternative Dispute Resolution. (Court Reporter:G. Madden.) (FTR Gold: No.) (BRP) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 77 MOTION to Compel Discovery and Supporting Brief filed by Plaintiff CAROLYN M. KLOECKNER. (Petruska, Lynette) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text ORDER: In-Court Hearing on pending Motion to Compel 77 will be held on March 25, 2014, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 10 South. So Ordered by Judge E. Richard Webber on 03/20/2014. (BABS) (Entered: 03/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 77 MOTION to Compel Discovery and Supporting Brief filed by Defendant Thomas E. Perez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Llewellyn, Nicholas) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Compel Discovery and Supporting Brief by Plaintiff CAROLYN M. KLOECKNER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-a, # 2 Exhibit 1-b, # 3 Exhibit 2)(Petruska, Lynette) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              [VACATED] ORDER REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution. (see order for details) This case is referred to: Mediation. Designation of Lead Counsel: Lynette Petruska. ADR Completion Deadline due by 5/9/2014. ADR Compliance Report Deadline due by 5/23/2014. Designation of Neutral due by 4/9/2014. ADR Conference Report Schedule due by 4/9/2014. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on 03/05/2014. (CBL) (See Memorandum and Order # 82 vacating the Order Referring Case to Alternative Dispute Resolution.) Modified on 3/26/2014 (BRP). (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on February 24, 2014. (BRP) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant Thomas E. Perez. (Attachments: # 1 Protective Order)(Llewellyn, Nicholas) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text ORDER: Joint Motion to Continue ADR Referral 72 is GRANTED. Previous ADR Referral 58 is VACATED. This cause will be referred to ADR on March 3, 2014, and that referral shall terminate on May 9, 2014. So Ordered by Judge E. Richard Webber on 11/15/2013. (BABS) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION to Continue ADR Referral Order by Plaintiff CAROLYN M. KLOECKNER, Defendant Thomas E. Perez. (Petruska, Lynette) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Docket Text ORDER: Motion to Withdraw 70 is GRANTED. Larry J. Stein shall be termed as counsel of record for Plaintiff and shall be removed from all future CM/ECF Notifications in this matter. So Ordered by Judge E. Richard Webber on 11/06/2013. (BABS) (Entered: 11/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Larry J. Stein by Plaintiff CAROLYN M. KLOECKNER. (Stein, Larry) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge E. Richard Webber: Motion Hearing held on 10/31/2013 re 63 MOTION to Amend/Correct Case Management Order. Motion is Granted by the Court. (Court Reporter:S. Moran.) (FTR Gold: No.) (CBL) (Entered: 10/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Pursuant to the Hearing held with counsel for all parties on this date and upon entry of appearance of new counsel for Plaintiff, Consent Motion to Amend Case Management Order [ECF No. 63 ] is GRANTED. (Motion to Join Parties due by 12/16/2013., Discovery Completion due by 4/28/2014., Dispositive Motions due by 5/28/2014., Jury Trial set for 10/6/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom 10S before District Judge E. Richard Webber., Pretrial Conference set for 9/25/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 10S before District Judge E. Richard Webber., Pretrial Compliance due by 9/15/2014., Motion in Limine due by 9/22/2014.) Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on October 31, 2013. (BRP) (Entered: 10/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docket Text ORDER: Motion to Continue 66 is GRANTED. Telephone Motion Hearing to address pending Motion to Amend 63 is RESET to October 31, 2013, at 10:30 a.m. The Court will initiate this conference call with Plaintiff's new counsel and counsel for the Defendant. So Ordered by Judge E. Richard Webber on 10/24/2013. (BABS) (Entered: 10/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Continue Motion Hearing Set for October 29, 2013 by Plaintiff CAROLYN M. KLOECKNER. (Petruska, Lynette) (Entered: 10/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Text ORDER: Due to a scheduling conflict, Telephone Motion Hearing to address pending Motion to Amend Case Management Order 63 filed by Plaintiff's newly entered counsel will be held on October 29, 2013, at 10:00 a.m., not October 24th as previously scheduled. The Court will initiate this conference call with new counsel and counsel for Defendant on the date and time set forth above. So Ordered by Judge E. Richard Webber on 10/21/2013. (BABS) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Docket Text ORDER: Telephone Motion Hearing will be held on October 24, 2013, at 11:00 a.m. to address pending Motion to Amend Case Management Order 63 filed by Plaintiff's newly entered counsel. The Court will initiate this conference call with new counsel and counsel for Defendant on the date and time set forth above. So Ordered by Judge E. Richard Webber on 10/21/2013. (BABS) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Amend/Correct Case Management Order by Plaintiff CAROLYN M. KLOECKNER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Petruska, Lynette) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ENTRY of Appearance by Lynette M. Petruska for Plaintiff CAROLYN M. KLOECKNER. (Petruska, Lynette) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Docket Text ORDER: Defendant Hilda L. Solis resigned as Secretary of Labor on January 22, 2013. Thomas E. Perez was nominated by President Obama to serve as the nation's 26th Secretary of Labor, and was sworn in on July 23, 2013. Defendant's name should be changed accordingly and all future pleadings shall reflect case of Kloeckner v. Perez. So Ordered by Judge E. Richard Webber on 10/16/2013. (BABS) (Entered: 10/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Docket Text ORDER: Motion to Amend 59 is GRANTED. Dispotitive Motion Deadline is extended up to and including December 16, 2013. Briefs in opposition shall be filed within twenty-one (21) days and any reply briefs shall be filed within seven (7) days, thereafter. All other deadlines set forth in this Court's Case Management Order, including the April 8, 2014 Trial Date remain in effect. So Ordered by Judge E. Richard Webber on 10/16/2013. (BABS) (Entered: 10/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Amend/Correct 54 Case Management Order,, by Defendant Seth D. Harris. (Llewellyn, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution. This case is referred to: Mediation. Designation of Lead Counsel: Larry J. Stein ADR Completion Deadline due by 11/26/2013. ADR Compliance Report Deadline due by 12/10/2013. Designation of Neutral due by 11/15/2013. ADR Conference Report Schedule due by 11/15/2013. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on October 8, 2013. (BRP) (Mailed to Christian Alexander Natiello) (Entered: 10/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees [ECF No. 52 ] is DENIED. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on June 27, 2013. (BRP) (Main Document 57 replaced on 6/27/2013) (BRP). (Entered: 06/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion re 55 Second MOTION for Attorney Fees , 52 First MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Defendant Hilda L. Solis. (Llewellyn, Nicholas) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Supplemental re: 52 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Plaintiff CAROLYN M. KLOECKNER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Stein, Larry) Modified on 3/14/2013 (CBL). (Entered: 03/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. (see order for details and deadlines) This case is assigned to Track: 2 (Standard). Motion to Join Parties due by 6/3/2013. Discovery Completion due by 2/14/2014. Non-Dispositive Motions due by 2/25/2014. ADR Future Reference 10/7/2013. Dispositive Motions due by 10/15/2013. Jury Trial set for 4/7/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom 10S before District Judge E. Richard Webber. Pretrial Conference set for 3/27/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10S before District Judge E. Richard Webber. Pretrial Compliance due by 3/17/2014. Motion in Limine due by 3/24/2014. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on 03/13/2013. (CBL) (Entered: 03/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff CAROLYN M. KLOECKNER, Defendant Hilda L. Solis. . (Llewellyn, Nicholas) (Entered: 03/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              First MOTION for Attorney Fees by Plaintiff CAROLYN M. KLOECKNER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Stein, Larry) (Entered: 03/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge E. Richard Webber: Telephone Conference held on 2/25/2013. Parties present for telephone status conference. Counsel to file joint scheduling plan within 14 days and Rule 16 conference to follow which the Court will set up. (Court Reporter:D. Kriegshauser.) (FTR Gold: No.) (MCB) (Entered: 02/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Text ORDER: The Supreme Court reversed the Judgment of the U.S. Court of Appeals and this matter has now been remanded for further proceedings to the District Court pursuant with the Supreme Court's decision. A Telephone Status Hearing in this matter will be held on February 25, 2013, at 10:00 a.m. The Court will initiate this telephone conference with counsel for all parties. So Ordered by Judge E. Richard Webber. (BABS) (Entered: 02/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER (JGW). IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the above styled cause is randomly reassigned to the Honorable E. Richard Webber. (KSM) (Entered: 02/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MANDATE of USCA as to 33 Notice of Appeal filed by CAROLYN M. KLOECKNER USCA #:10-2048(JWJ) (Entered: 02/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        USCA JUDGMENT The Supreme Court reversed the judgment of this court and remanded for further proceedings consistent with its decision. Kloeckner v. Solis, 133 S. Ct. 596 (2012), revg Kloeckner v. Solis, 639 F.3d 834 (8th Cir. 2011). We have recalled our mandate and now remand the case to the district court for further proceedings consistent with the Supreme Courts decision. as to 33 Notice of Appeal filed by CAROLYN M. KLOECKNER (JWJ) (Entered: 02/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER of USCA as to 33 Notice of Appeal filed by CAROLYN M. KLOECKNER USCA Appeal #: 10-2048. Pursuant to the judgment of the United States Supreme Court dated December 10, 2012, this court's judgment, dated May 13, 2011, is vacated, the mandate recalled, and the case is reopened. (NCL) (Entered: 01/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER from USCA re 33 Notice of Appeal : USCA Appeal #: 11-184. (NCL) (Entered: 07/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/1/2012, Entered: 2/1/2012 Letter re:Writ of Certiorari filed w/US Supreme Court
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER from USCA regarding writ of certiorari filed with the U.S. Supreme Court USCA Appeal #: 10-2048. The Court today entered the following order in the above-entitled case: The petition for a writ of certiorari is granted.(BAK) (Entered: 02/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/1/2012, Entered: 2/1/2012 Letter re:Writ of Certiorari filed w/US Supreme Court
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER from USCA regarding writ of certiorari filed with the U.S. Supreme Court USCA Appeal #: 10-2048. The petition for a writ of certiorari in the above entitled case was filed on 8/11/11 and placed on the docket 8/15/11 as No. 11-184(BAK) (Entered: 02/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/7/2011, Entered: 7/7/2011 USCA Mandate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MANDATE of USCA as to 33 Notice of Appeal filed by CAROLYN M. KLOECKNER USCA #:10-2048(BAK) (Entered: 07/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: 6/7/2011 USCA Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER of USCA USCA Appeal #: 10-2048. On the court's own motion, the mandate issued 6/3/11 in this matter is hereby recalled. (BAK) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: 6/3/2011 USCA Mandate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MANDATE of USCA as to 33 Notice of Appeal filed by CAROLYN M. KLOECKNER USCA #:10-2048. In accordance with the opinion and judgment of 05/13/2011, and pursuant to the provisions of Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 41(a), the formal mandate is hereby issued in the above-styled matter. (NCL) (Entered: 06/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 39 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: 5/13/2011 Opinion from USCA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OPINION from USCA re 33 Notice of Appeal : USCA Appeal #: 10-2048 AFFIRMED (BAK) (Entered: 05/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: 5/13/2011 USCA Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JUDGMENT of USCA USCA Appeal #: 10-2048. This appeal from the United States District Court was submitted on the record of the district court and briefs of the parties. After consideration, it is hereby ordered and adjudged that the judgment of the district court in this cause is affirmed in accordance with the opinion of this Court.(BAK) (Entered: 05/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: 7/8/2010 Appeal Transmittal Acknowledgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Appeal Transmittal Acknowledgment USCA Appeal #: 10-2048 The following has been acknowledged as received by USCA: 21 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss with exhibits(JWJ) (Entered: 07/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/18/2010, Entered: 6/18/2010 Appeal Transmittal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Appeal Transmittal The following has been forwarded to USCA: 21 Memorandum in Support with exhibits(BAK) (Entered: 06/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: 5/12/2010 Notification and/or Briefing Schedule from USCA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Initial Notification and or Briefing Schedule from USCA for 33 Notice of Appeal filed by CAROLYN M. KLOECKNER USCA Appeal Number: 10-2048 Method of Appendix due: 6/21/10 Briefs due: 6/21/10 (Attachments: # 1 Briefing Schedule)(BAK) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 34 Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: 5/11/2010 Notification of Appeal and NOA Supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL AND NOA SUPPLEMENT by clerk to USCA regarding 32 Order of Dismissal (case - Stipulation of Dismissal), 31 Memorandum & Order. Notice of Appeal filed on 4/14/10. NOTIFICATION TO COUNSEL AND PRO SE PARTY: FILE REQUEST FOR TRANSCRIPT WITH DISTRICT COURT CLERKS OFFICE. SUBMIT FORM A & B TO EIGHTH CIRCUIT CLERKS OFFICE(BAK) (Entered: 05/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 33 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: 5/11/2010 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEAL by Plaintiff CAROLYN M. KLOECKNER. Filing fee $ 455. Rcpt # 0865-2224422(BAK) Modified on 5/11/2010 (BAK). (Entered: 05/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/18/2010, Entered: 2/18/2010 Order of Dismissal (case - Stipulation of Dismissal)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER OF DISMISSAL - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that plaintiffCarolyn Kloeckners complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Donald J. Stohr on 2/18/10. (KJF, ) (Entered: 02/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 31 Filed: 2/18/2010, Entered: 2/18/2010 Memorandum and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant Hilda Solis motionto dismiss [Doc. # 20 ] is granted. Signed by Honorable Donald J. Stohr on 2/18/10. (KJF, ) (Entered: 02/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/30/2009, Entered: 9/30/2009 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 20 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Elaine Chao. (Davis, Stephen) (Entered: 09/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/24/2009, Entered: 9/24/2009 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Motion re 28 MOTION for Leave to present oral argument filed by Defendant Elaine Chao. (Davis, Stephen) (Entered: 09/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/24/2009, Entered: 9/24/2009 motion for leave to
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to present oral argument by Plaintiff CAROLYN M. KLOECKNER. (Stein, Larry) (Entered: 09/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/11/2009, Entered: 9/11/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Elaine Chao. (Davis, Stephen) (Entered: 09/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/8/2009, Entered: 9/8/2009 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 20 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Plaintiff CAROLYN M. KLOECKNER. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Stein, Larry) (Entered: 09/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/3/2009, Entered: 8/4/2009 Motion for Extension
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Consent MOTION To Enlarge Time To File Opposition to Defendant's Motion To Dismiss For Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, or in the alternative, For Summary Judgment by Plaintiff CAROLYN M. KLOECKNER. (MRC) (Entered: 08/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/3/2009, Entered: 8/4/2009 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Change of Address of Plaintiff's Counsel filed by Larry J. Stein (MRC) (Entered: 08/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 23 Filed: 8/3/2009, Entered: 8/4/2009 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Larry J. Stein (Filing fee $100) by Plaintiff CAROLYN M. KLOECKNER. (MRC) (Entered: 08/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/2/2009, Entered: 7/2/2009 Statement of Material Facts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATEMENT of Material Facts re 20 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Elaine Chao. (Davis, Stephen) (Entered: 07/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/2/2009, Entered: 7/2/2009 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re 20 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, or in the alternative, For Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Elaine Chao. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Davis, Stephen) (Entered: 07/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 20 Filed: 7/2/2009, Entered: 7/2/2009 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, or in the alternative, For Summary Judgment by Defendant Elaine Chao. (Davis, Stephen) (Entered: 07/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/9/2009, Entered: 6/10/2009 Mail Returned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Mail Returned as Undeliverable -- Unable to forward. Mail sent to Larry J. Stein 17 (KJF, ) Modified on 6/11/2009 (KCM). (Entered: 06/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/2/2009, Entered: 6/2/2009 Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ENTRY of Appearance by Stephen S. Davis for Defendant Elaine Chao. (Davis, Stephen) (Entered: 06/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/29/2009, Entered: 5/29/2009 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, notwithstanding Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(d) and (f), any party who has entered an appearance may, without leave of Court, serve interrogatories and requests for production or inspection upon the plaintiff at any time, and upon any other party after that party's entry of appearance. Parties shall respond to such discovery requests within 30 days of service of the discovery requests. No party may, without leave of Court, take oral depositions or serve requests for admission prior to the Court's issuance of a Case Management Order. As permitted by this order, discovery shall commence immediately. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, in the event that a party serves discovery requests upon a party who has not entered an appearance as of the date of this order, a copy of this order shall be served along with the discovery requests. Signed by Honorable Donald J. Stohr on 5/29/09. (KJF, ) (Entered: 05/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: 5/26/2009 Case Transferred In - District Transfer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:08-cv-00762. Original file with documents numbered 1 - 15, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case transferred in electronically. (SAJ) (Entered: 05/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 5/15/2009, Entered: 5/15/2009 Memorandum and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM ORDER granting Defendant's Motion 9 to Transfer For Improper Venue. ORDERED that the above-captioned case be transferred to the Eastern District of Missouri. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 5/15/09. (kc) (Entered: 05/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 14 Filed: 12/23/2008, Entered: 12/23/2008 Oral Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Order for oral argument by CAROLYN M. KLOECKNER (Stein, Larry) (Entered: 12/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: 12/22/2008 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to opposition to motion re 9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by ELAINE L. CHAO. (Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 12/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/10/2008, Entered: 12/10/2008 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in opposition to re 9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by CAROLYN M. KLOECKNER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Agency Motion to Dismiss MSPB Appeal, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit)(Stein, Larry) (Entered: 12/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/26/2008, Entered: 10/26/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 9 MOTION to Dismiss by CAROLYN M. KLOECKNER (Stein, Larry) (Entered: 10/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: 10/6/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 9 MOTION to Dismiss by CAROLYN M. KLOECKNER (Stein, Larry) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/29/2008, Entered: 9/29/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss by ELAINE L. CHAO (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-A, # 2 Exhibit 1-B, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5)(Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 09/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: 8/28/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by ELAINE L. CHAO (Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 08/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: 8/28/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Christian Alexander Natiello on behalf of ELAINE L. CHAO (Natiello, Christian) (Entered: 08/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: 7/16/2008 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney. (Stein, Larry) (Entered: 07/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: 7/16/2008 Summons Issued as to USA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to (Stein, Larry) (Entered: 07/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: 7/16/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to USA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 07/01/2008. (Stein, Larry) (Entered: 07/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 6/30/08., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to ELAINE L. CHAO served on 6/30/2008, answer due 8/29/2008., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney served on 6/30/2008, answer due 8/29/2008 (td, ) (Entered: 07/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: 5/16/2008 Memorandum and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 5/16/2008. (lcrjl2) (Entered: 05/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 5/1/2008, Entered: 5/7/2008 Complaint (Removal/Transfer)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against ELAINE L. CHAO ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616012085) filed by CAROLYN M. KLOECKNER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jf, ) (Entered: 05/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 326 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?