Russo, et al., v. Regal Stone, Ltd. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:07-cv-05800-SC
District Judge Samuel Conti, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 16, 2017 at 11:15 PM EDT (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Chelsea, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anthony M. Urie +1 206 859 3400 +1 206 542 3280 anthonyurie@gmail.com

Represented by Audet & Partners, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John P. Gustafson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anthony M. Urie +1 206 859 3400 +1 206 542 3280 anthonyurie@gmail.com
v.
No Logo China Ocean Shipping Company, Defendant
No Logo Conti Cairo KG, Defendant
No Logo Fleet Management, Ltd., in personam, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Keesal, Young & Logan, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John D. Giffin +1 415 398 6000 +1 415 981 0136 john.giffin@kyl.com
Space Anne Maureen Moriarty +1 415 398 6000 annie.moriarty@kyl.com
No Logo Hanjin Shipping Company, Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Hanjin Shipping, Co., Ltd."

Toggle Switch Represented by Flynn, Delich & Wise

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Conte C. Cicala +1 415 693 5566 +1 415 693 0410 contec@fdw-law.com
Space Aleksandrs Eduards Drumalds +1 562 435 2626 +1 562 437 7555 aleksd@fdw-law.com
Space James Barton Nebel +1 415 693 5566 +1 415 693 0410 jamesn@fdw-law.com
Space Erich Paul Wise +1 562 435 2626 +1 562 437 7555 Erichw@fdw-law.com
No Logo John Cota, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Charles D Naylor Law Offices

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George M. Jones +1 562 216 2948 +1 562 685 0460 gjones@naylorlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Coppenrath Jones LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Phillip S. Dalton +1 562 216 2948 +1 562 252 1136 pdalton@coppenrathlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Xiang Xie

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Walter Gerard Coppenrath, Jr. +1 562 216 2948 +1 562 252 1136 waltla@aol.com
No Logo M/V Cosco Busan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Keesal, Young & Logan, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nicole Bussi +1 415 398 6000 nicole.bussi@kyl.com
Space John D. Giffin +1 415 398 6000 +1 415 981 0136 john.giffin@kyl.com
Space Anne Maureen Moriarty +1 415 398 6000 annie.moriarty@kyl.com
No Logo NSB Neiderelbe, Defendant
No Logo Regal Stone, Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Clyde & Co US LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph Albert Walsh +1 562 317 3300 +1 562 317 3399 Joe.Walsh@clydeco.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Keesal, Young & Logan, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nicole Bussi +1 415 398 6000 nicole.bussi@kyl.com
Space John D. Giffin +1 415 398 6000 +1 415 981 0136 john.giffin@kyl.com
Space Elizabeth Ann Kendrick +1 562 436 2000 +1 562 436 7416 elizabeth.kendrick@kyl.com
Space Anne Maureen Moriarty +1 415 398 6000 annie.moriarty@kyl.com
Space Christopher A. Stecher +1 415 398 6000 +1 415 981 0136 christopher.stecher@kyl.com
Space Julie L. Taylor +1 415 398 6000 julie.taylor@kyl.com
Space David Andrew Tong +1 562 436 2000 +1 562 436 7416 david.tong@kyl.com
Space Gordon Craig Young +1 415 398 6000 gordon.young@kyl.com
No Logo Synergy Maritime, Ltd. In Personam, Defendant
No Logo John Cota, Third Party Defendant
Office San Francisco
Filed 11/15/2007
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case
Related Cases
307-cv-05926-SC, 308-cv-02052-SC
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ADRMOP, E-Filing, RELATE
  Entries (304) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry: Consent Decree Hearing held on 1/27/2012 before Judge Samuel Conti (Date Filed: 1/27/2012). (Court Reporter Sahar Bartlett.) (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/27/2012) (Entered: 01/27/2012) (Entered: 02/14/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None
    CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 11/18/11 is continued to 1/27/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2011) (Entered: 11/07/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 10/7/2011, Entered: None
      NOTICE by CVS Caremark Corporation of Change of Attorney Information for attorneys Clinton J McCord and Jon-Paul Lapointe counsel for CVS Caremark Corporation. Changing firm name to EDWARDS WILDMAN PALMER LLP. Changing e-mails to cmccord@edwardswildman.com and jlapointe@edwardswildman.com respectively. (McCord, Clinton) (Filed on 10/7/2011) (Entered: 10/07/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 9/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti denying (294) Motion to Relate Case C-07-5800-SC and C-11-4540-DMR (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2011) (Entered: 09/27/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None
          RESPONSE (re 294 MOTION to Relate Case ) OPPOSITION TO CVS CAREMARK CORPORATION'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO RELATE CASE filed byFleet Management Ltd., Regal Stone, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration OF JOSEPH A. WALSH II IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO CVS CAREMARK CORPORATION'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO RELATE CASE, # 2 Proposed Order DENYING CVS CAREMARK CORPORATION'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO RELATE CASE)(Tong, David) (Filed on 9/26/2011) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None
            Declaration of Jon-Paul Lapointe in Support of 294 MOTION to Relate Case filed byCVS Caremark Corporation. (Related document(s) 294 ) (McCord, Clinton) (Filed on 9/22/2011) (Entered: 09/22/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 9/22/2011, Entered: None
              MOTION to Relate Case filed by CVS Caremark Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(McCord, Clinton) (Filed on 9/22/2011) (Entered: 09/22/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: None
                CLERKS NOTICE Status Conference set for 9/9/2011 is continued to 11/18/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2011) (Entered: 09/02/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                  Letter from Joseph A. Walsh II to Judge Samuel Conti. (Walsh, Joseph) (Filed on 8/31/2011) (Entered: 08/31/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: None
                    CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 9/9/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2011) (Entered: 07/14/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 2/9/2011, Entered: None
                      NOTICE by John Atkinson, Steven Fitz, Sean Hodges, John T. Tarantino NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME (Gross, Stuart) (Filed on 2/9/2011) (Entered: 02/09/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: None
                        NOTICE by John Cota of Firm Name Change (Jones, George) (Filed on 2/3/2011) (Entered: 02/03/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting in part and denying in part 212 Motion for Attorney Fees (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2010) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 11/18/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER DENYING Stipulation Regarding Additional Notice and Extension of Closure Claim Deadline to Certain Potential Dungeness Crab Settlement Class Members. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 11/18/10. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2010) (Entered: 11/18/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: None
                              Letter from S. Gross and J. Kole Regarding Additional Notice and Extension of Closure Claim Deadline to Certain Potential Dungeness Crab Settlement Class Members. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gross, Stuart) (Filed on 11/12/2010) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: None
                                DECLARATION of Julie L. Taylor (Supplemental) in Response to Declaration of Class Counsel filed byFleet Management Ltd., M/V Cosco Busan, Regal Stone, Ltd.. (Moriarty, Anne) (Filed on 11/9/2010) (Entered: 11/09/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: None
                                  DECLARATION of Julie L. Taylor in Response to Declaration of Class Counsel filed byFleet Management Ltd., M/V Cosco Busan, Regal Stone, Ltd.. (Moriarty, Anne) (Filed on 11/3/2010) (Entered: 11/03/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 10/30/2010, Entered: None
                                    ERRATA re 282 Declaration in Support, Of Class Counsel's Motion For Attorneys' Fees, Costs, And Service Awards To Named Plaintiffs by John Atkinson, Steven Fitz, Sean Hodges, Allen Loretz, John T. Tarantino. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Corrected Supplemental Declaration of Stuart Gross ISO Class Counsel's Motion For Attorneys' Fees, Costs, And Service Awards To Named Plaintiffs), # 2 Exhibit 1-6 Of Corrected Suplemental Declaration)(Gross, Stuart) (Filed on 10/30/2010) (Entered: 10/30/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: None
                                      Declaration in Support of 212 MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice Of Motion, Motion, And Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Class Counsels Motion For Award Of Attorneys Fees, Costs, And Service Awards To The Named Plaintiffs filed byJohn Atkinson, Steven Fitz, Sean Hodges, Allen Loretz, John T. Tarantino. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-6)(Related document(s) 212 ) (Gross, Stuart) (Filed on 10/29/2010) (Entered: 10/29/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 10/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER Requiring Supplemental Declarations. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 10/22/2010. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2010) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: None
                                          Declaration of Stuart G. Gross in Support of 279 Response ( Non Motion ) Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Objections to Class Counsel's Fee Records filed byJohn Atkinson, Steven Fitz, Sean Hodges, John T. Tarantino. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22)(Related document(s) 279 ) (Gross, Stuart) (Filed on 9/29/2010) (Entered: 09/29/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: None
                                            RESPONSE to re 277 Objection, Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Objections to Class Counsels' Fee Records by Allen Loretz. (Audet, William) (Filed on 9/29/2010) (Entered: 09/29/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                              Declaration of Anne Moriarty in Support of 277 Objection, Declaration of Anne Moriarty in Support of Defendants' Objections to Class Counsel's Fee Records filed byFleet Management Ltd., Fleet Management, Ltd., in personam, M/V Cosco Busan, Regal Stone, Ltd.. (Related document(s) 277 ) (Moriarty, Anne) (Filed on 9/24/2010) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                OBJECTIONS to re 212 MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice Of Motion, Motion, And Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Class Counsels Motion For Award Of Attorneys Fees, Costs, And Service Awards To The Named Plaintiffs Defendants' Objections to Class Counsel's Fee Records by Fleet Management Ltd., Fleet Management, Ltd., in personam, M/V Cosco Busan, Regal Stone, Ltd.. (Moriarty, Anne) (Filed on 9/24/2010) (Entered: 09/24/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                  Declaration of Stuart G. Gross in Support of 212 MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice Of Motion, Motion, And Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Class Counsels Motion For Award Of Attorneys Fees, Costs, And Service Awards To The Named Plaintiffs filed byJohn Atkinson, Steven Fitz, Sean Hodges, John T. Tarantino. (Related document(s) 212 ) (Gross, Stuart) (Filed on 9/20/2010) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                    Declaration of William M. Audet in Support of 212 MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice Of Motion, Motion, And Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Class Counsels Motion For Award Of Attorneys Fees, Costs, And Service Awards To The Named Plaintiffs Supplemental Declaration of William M. Audet Pursuant to the Court's Order of September 10, 2010 filed byAllen Loretz. (Related document(s) 212 ) (Nadji, Adel) (Filed on 9/20/2010) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                      Declaration of Adel A. Nadji in Support of 212 MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice Of Motion, Motion, And Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Class Counsels Motion For Award Of Attorneys Fees, Costs, And Service Awards To The Named Plaintiffs filed byAllen Loretz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 212 ) (Nadji, Adel) (Filed on 9/14/2010) (Entered: 09/14/2010)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                        Declaration of Stuart G. Gross in Support of 212 MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice Of Motion, Motion, And Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Class Counsels Motion For Award Of Attorneys Fees, Costs, And Service Awards To The Named Plaintiffs SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF STUART G. GROSS filed byJohn Atkinson, Steven Fitz, Sean Hodges, John T. Tarantino. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Part A, # 2 Exhibit 1 Part B, # 3 Exhibit 1 Part C)(Related document(s) 212 ) (Gross, Stuart) (Filed on 9/14/2010) (Entered: 09/14/2010)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti re: 267 Motion for Administrative Relief (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2010) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                            Proposed Order re 267 MOTION CLASS COUNSELS MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF REGARDING ORDERS re 266 Order by Allen Loretz. (Audet, William) (Filed on 9/10/2010) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                              Reply to Opposition Class Counsel's Reply to Defendants' Response to Class Counsel's 267 Motion for Administrative Relief filed byAllen Loretz. (Audet, William) (Filed on 9/10/2010) Modified on 9/14/2010 (aaa, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/10/2010)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                Proposed Order re 268 Memorandum in Opposition Regarding Class Counsel's Motion for Administrative Relief by Fleet Management Ltd., M/V Cosco Busan, Regal Stone, Ltd.. (Moriarty, Anne) (Filed on 9/10/2010) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                  Memorandum in Opposition Response to Class Counsel's 267 Motion for Administrative Relief filed byFleet Management Ltd., M/V Cosco Busan, Regal Stone, Ltd.. (Moriarty, Anne) (Filed on 9/10/2010) Modified on 9/14/2010 (aaa, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/10/2010)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                                    MOTION CLASS COUNSELS MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF REGARDING ORDERS re 266 Order filed by John Atkinson, Steven Fitz, Sean Hodges, John T. Tarantino. (Gross, Stuart) (Filed on 9/10/2010) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER Requiring Supplemental Declarations re: Attorneys' Fees and Costs. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 9/10/2010. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2010) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting (45) Motion to Dismiss Captain McIsaac and Captain Nyborg and denying Request for Attorney Fees in case 3:08-cv-05098-SC (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2010) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          Final ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti Approving Class Action Settlement, and Dismissing Class Action with prejudice (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2010) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                            Minute Entry: Minute Entry: Plaintiffs Motion for Final Approval of Dungeness Crab Settlement Granted. Plaintiffs Motion for Attorneys Fees continued. Case Continued to 9/17/10 at 10:00 a.m. for Plaintiffs Motion for Attorneys Fees and a further status conference in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Court Reporter Belle Ball.) (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/3/2010) (Entered: 09/03/2010) (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/3/2010) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 8/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE by John Atkinson, Steven Fitz, Sean Hodges, John T. Tarantino re 236 Reply to Opposition, 247 Declaration in Support, NOTICE OF ERRATA TO THE DECLARATION OF KEVIN MARILLEY (Gross, Stuart) (Filed on 8/27/2010) (Entered: 08/27/2010)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 8/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                Declaration in Support of 260 Memorandum in Opposition, Declaration of Adel A. Nadji in Support of Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Evidentiary Objections filed byAllen Loretz. (Related document(s) 260 ) (Audet, William) (Filed on 8/27/2010) (Entered: 08/27/2010)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 8/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                  Memorandum in Opposition Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Evidentiary 258 Objections to Evidence Submitted By Class Counsel With Their Reply In Support Of Motion For Attorney's Fees filed byAllen Loretz. (Audet, William) (Filed on 8/27/2010) Modified on 8/30/2010 (aaa, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/27/2010)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 8/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                    RESPONSE to Plaintiff's 258 Objections to Evidence Submitted in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees by Fleet Management Ltd., M/V Cosco Busan, Regal Stone, Ltd.. (Moriarty, Anne) (Filed on 8/24/2010) Modified on 8/25/2010 (aaa, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/24/2010)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 8/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                      OBJECTIONS to (Evidentiary) to Evidence Submitted by Class Counsel With Their Reply in Support of 212 Motion for Attorneys' Fees by Fleet Management Ltd., M/V Cosco Busan, Regal Stone, Ltd.. (Moriarty, Anne) (Filed on 8/24/2010) Modified on 8/25/2010 (aaa, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/24/2010)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                        Declaration of WILLIAM M. AUDET in Support of 236 Reply to Opposition CLASS COUNSELS MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES, COSTS, AND SERVICE AWARDS TO THE NAMED PLAINTIFFS (PART 3 OF 3) filed byJohn Atkinson, Steven Fitz, Sean Hodges, Allen Loretz, John T. Tarantino. (Related document(s) 236 ) (Gross, Stuart) (Filed on 8/20/2010) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                          Declaration of WILLIAM M. AUDET in Support of 236 Reply to Opposition CLASS COUNSELS MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES, COSTS, AND SERVICE AWARDS TO THE NAMED PLAINTIFFS (PART 2 OF 3) filed byJohn Atkinson, Steven Fitz, Sean Hodges, Allen Loretz, John T. Tarantino. (Related document(s) 236 ) (Gross, Stuart) (Filed on 8/20/2010) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                            Declaration of WILLIAM M. AUDET in Support of 236 Reply to Opposition TO CLASS COUNSELS MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES, COSTS, AND SERVICE AWARDS TO THE NAMED PLAINTIFFS filed byJohn Atkinson, Steven Fitz, Sean Hodges, Allen Loretz, John T. Tarantino. (Related document(s) 236 ) (Gross, Stuart) (Filed on 8/20/2010) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                              Declaration of JOSEPH R. SAVERI in Support of 236 Reply to Opposition TO CLASS COUNSELS' MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES filed byJohn Atkinson, Steven Fitz, Sean Hodges, John T. Tarantino. (Related document(s) 236 ) (Gross, Stuart) (Filed on 8/20/2010) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                Declaration of STEVEN F. FITZ in Support of 236 Reply to Opposition TO CLASS COUNSELS' MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES, COSTS, AND SERVICE AWARDS TO THE NAMED PLAINTIFFS filed byJohn Atkinson, Steven Fitz, Sean Hodges, John T. Tarantino. (Related document(s) 236 ) (Gross, Stuart) (Filed on 8/20/2010) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Declaration of SEAN HODGES in Support of 236 Reply to Opposition TO CLASS COUNSELS' MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES, COSTS, AND SERVICE AWARDS TO THE NAMED PLAINTIFFS filed byJohn Atkinson, Steven Fitz, Sean Hodges, John T. Tarantino. (Related document(s) 236 ) (Gross, Stuart) (Filed on 8/20/2010) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 251 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Declaration of R. ALEXANDER SAVERI in Support of 236 Reply to Opposition TO CLASS COUNSELS' MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES filed byJohn Atkinson, Steven Fitz, Sean Hodges, John T. Tarantino. (Related document(s) 236 ) (Gross, Stuart) (Filed on 8/20/2010) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Declaration of FRANK M. PITRE in Support of 236 Reply to Opposition TO CLASS COUNSELS' MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES, COSTS, AND SERVICE AWARDS TO THE NAMED PLAINTIFFS filed byJohn Atkinson, Steven Fitz, Sean Hodges, John T. Tarantino. (Related document(s) 236 ) (Gross, Stuart) (Filed on 8/20/2010) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Declaration of MICHAEL FONTES in Support of 236 Reply to Opposition TO CLASS COUNSELS MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES, COSTS, AND SERVICE AWARDS TO THE NAMED PLAINTIFFS filed byJohn Atkinson, Steven Fitz, Sean Hodges, John T. Tarantino. (Related document(s) 236 ) (Gross, Stuart) (Filed on 8/20/2010) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Declaration of MATTHEW RYAN in Support of 236 Reply to Opposition TO CLASS COUNSELS MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES, COSTS, AND SERVICE AWARDS TO THE NAMED PLAINTIFFS filed byJohn Atkinson, Steven Fitz, Sean Hodges, John T. Tarantino. (Related document(s) 236 ) (Gross, Stuart) (Filed on 8/20/2010) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Declaration of KEVIN MARILLEY in Support of 236 Reply to Opposition TO CLASS COUNSELS MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES, COSTS, AND SERVICE AWARDS TO THE NAMED PLAINTIFFS filed byJohn Atkinson, Steven Fitz, Sean Hodges, John T. Tarantino. (Related document(s) 236 ) (Gross, Stuart) (Filed on 8/20/2010) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Declaration of JOHN T. TARANTINO in Support of 236 Reply to Opposition TO CLASS COUNSELS MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES, COSTS, AND SERVICE AWARDS TO THE NAMED PLAINTIFFS filed byJohn Atkinson, Steven Fitz, Sean Hodges, John T. Tarantino. (Related document(s) 236 ) (Gross, Stuart) (Filed on 8/20/2010) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Declaration of JOHN DIVITT in Support of 236 Reply to Opposition TO CLASS COUNSELS MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES, COSTS, AND SERVICE AWARDS TO THE NAMED PLAINTIFFS filed byJohn Atkinson, Steven Fitz, Sean Hodges, John T. Tarantino. (Related document(s) 236 ) (Gross, Stuart) (Filed on 8/20/2010) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Declaration of JOHN ATKINSON in Support of 236 Reply to Opposition TO CLASS COUNSELS MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES, COSTS, AND SERVICE AWARDS TO THE NAMED PLAINTIFFS filed byJohn Atkinson, Steven Fitz, Sean Hodges, John T. Tarantino. (Related document(s) 236 ) (Gross, Stuart) (Filed on 8/20/2010) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Declaration of ERNIE KOEPF in Support of 236 Reply to Opposition TO CLASS COUNSELS MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES, COSTS, AND SERVICE AWARDS TO THE NAMED PLAINTIFFS filed byJohn Atkinson, Steven Fitz, Sean Hodges, John T. Tarantino. (Related document(s) 236 ) (Gross, Stuart) (Filed on 8/20/2010) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Declaration of STUART G. GROSS in Support of 236 Reply to Opposition TO CLASS COUNSELS MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES, COSTS, AND SERVICE AWARDS TO THE NAMED PLAINTIFFS filed byJohn Atkinson, Steven Fitz, Sean Hodges, John T. Tarantino. (Related document(s) 236 ) (Gross, Stuart) (Filed on 8/20/2010) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Declaration in Support of 236 Reply to Opposition TO CLASS COUNSELS MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES, COSTS, AND SERVICE AWARDS TO THE NAMED PLAINTIFFS filed byJohn Atkinson, Steven Fitz, Sean Hodges, John T. Tarantino. (Related document(s) 236 ) (Gross, Stuart) (Filed on 8/20/2010) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Declaration of Rachel Christman in Support of 236 Reply to Opposition Class Counsels' Motion for Award of Attorneys Fees, Costs and Service Awards to Named Plaintiffs filed byAllen Loretz. (Related document(s) 236 ) (Nadji, Adel) (Filed on 8/20/2010) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Declaration of Adel A. Nadji in Support of 238 Objection, Plaintiffs' Objection to Declaration of John G. Young, Cynthia Hudson, Paul B. Gruwell, John Cox, and Julie L. Taylor filed byAllen Loretz. (Related document(s) 238 ) (Nadji, Adel) (Filed on 8/20/2010) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              OBJECTIONS to re 232 Declaration in Support,, 233 Declaration in Support,, 229 Declaration in Support, 231 Declaration in Support, 230 Declaration in Support, Plaintiffs' Objection to Declaration of John G. Young, Cynthia Hudson, Paul B. Gruwell, John Cox, and Julie L. Taylor by Allen Loretz. (Nadji, Adel) (Filed on 8/20/2010) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Objection to 220 Declaration of Steven Fitz filed byAllen Loretz. (Nadji, Adel) (Filed on 8/20/2010) Modified on 8/23/2010 (aaa, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Reply to Opposition to Class Counsels' 212 Motion for Award of Attorneys Fees, Costs and Service Awards to Named Plaintiffs filed byAllen Loretz. (Nadji, Adel) (Filed on 8/20/2010) Modified on 8/23/2010 (aaa, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Statement of Non-Opposition re 210 MOTION to Certify Class Notice Of Motion and Motion For Final Approval Of Dungeness Crab Settlement And Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof and Joinder in Opposition to Class Counsel's Motion for Award of Attorney Fees 227 filed byJohn Cota. (Related document(s) 210 ) (Jones, George) (Filed on 7/30/2010) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 7/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Fleet Management, Ltd., in personam, M/V Cosco Busan, Regal Stone, Ltd. re 232 Declaration in Support,, 233 Declaration in Support,, 227 Memorandum in Opposition, 228 Objection, 229 Declaration in Support, 231 Declaration in Support, 230 Declaration in Support, Defs. Regal, Fleet and M/V Cosco Busan's Notice of Withdrawal of Paragraph 10 of the Decl. of Julie Taylor File in Support of Opposition to Class Counsels' Motion for Attorneys' Fees (Moriarty, Anne) (Filed on 7/29/2010) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Julie L Taylor in Support of 232 Declaration in Support,, 227 Memorandum in Opposition, 228 Objection, 229 Declaration in Support, 231 Declaration in Support, 230 Declaration in Support, Defendants' Opposition to Class Counsels' Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Costs and Service Awards to Named Plaintiffs filed byFleet Management Ltd., M/V Cosco Busan, Regal Stone, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-4 of Declaration of Julie L Taylor, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits 5-6 to Declaration of Julie L Taylor)(Related document(s) 232 , 227 , 228 , 229 , 231 , 230 ) (Moriarty, Anne) (Filed on 7/23/2010) (Entered: 07/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Declaration of John C Cox in Support of 227 Memorandum in Opposition, 228 Objection, 229 Declaration in Support, 231 Declaration in Support, 230 Declaration in Support, Defendants' Opposition to Class Counsels' Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Costs and Service Awards to Named Plaintiffs filed byFleet Management Ltd., M/V Cosco Busan, Regal Stone, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-5 to John C Cox Declaration)(Related document(s) 227 , 228 , 229 , 231 , 230 ) (Moriarty, Anne) (Filed on 7/23/2010) (Entered: 07/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Paul B Gruwell in Support of 227 Memorandum in Opposition, 228 Objection, 229 Declaration in Support, 230 Declaration in Support, Defendants' Opposition to Class Counsels' Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Costs and Service Awards to Named Plaintiffs filed byFleet Management Ltd., M/V Cosco Busan, Regal Stone, Ltd.. (Related document(s) 227 , 228 , 229 , 230 ) (Moriarty, Anne) (Filed on 7/23/2010) (Entered: 07/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Cynthia Hudson in Support of 227 Memorandum in Opposition, 228 Objection, 229 Declaration in Support, Defendants' Opposition to Class Counsels' Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Costs and Service Awards to Named Plaintiffs filed byFleet Management Ltd., M/V Cosco Busan, Regal Stone, Ltd.. (Related document(s) 227 , 228 , 229 ) (Moriarty, Anne) (Filed on 7/23/2010) (Entered: 07/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Declaration of John G Young in Support of 227 Memorandum in Opposition, 228 Objection Defendants' Opposition to Class Counsels' Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Costs and Service Awards to Named Plaintiffs filed byFleet Management Ltd., M/V Cosco Busan, Regal Stone, Ltd.. (Related document(s) 227 , 228 ) (Moriarty, Anne) (Filed on 7/23/2010) (Entered: 07/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  OBJECTIONS to re 227 Memorandum in Opposition Defendants' Objection to Declaration of Steven Fitz by Fleet Management Ltd., M/V Cosco Busan, Regal Stone, Ltd.. (Moriarty, Anne) (Filed on 7/23/2010) (Entered: 07/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 227 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Class Counsels' 212 Motion for Award of Attorneys Fees, Costs and Service Awards to Named Plaintiffs filed byFleet Management Ltd., M/V Cosco Busan, Regal Stone, Ltd.. (Moriarty, Anne) (Filed on 7/23/2010) Modified on 7/26/2010 (aaa, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Fleet Management Ltd., M/V Cosco Busan, Regal Stone, Ltd. Non-Opposition to Plaintiffs' 210 Motion for Final Approval of Dungeness Crab Settlement (Moriarty, Anne) (Filed on 7/23/2010) Modified on 7/26/2010 (aaa, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Stuart G. Gross in Support of 224 Proposed Order, Declaration of Stuart G. Gross in Regards to Plaintiffs' [Proposed] Corrected Final Order Approving Class Action Settlement, and Dismissing Class Action with Prejudice filed byAllen Loretz. (Related document(s) 224 ) (Gross, Stuart) (Filed on 7/7/2010) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Order re 210 MOTION to Certify Class Notice Of Motion and Motion For Final Approval Of Dungeness Crab Settlement And Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof CORRECTED PROPOSED ORDER by Allen Loretz. (Gross, Stuart) (Filed on 7/7/2010) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Frank Mario Pitre for Intervenors and as Class Counsel (Pitre, Frank) (Filed on 7/6/2010) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart George Gross for Intervenors and as Class Counsel (Gross, Stuart) (Filed on 7/6/2010) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Sean Hodges in Support of 212 MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice Of Motion, Motion, And Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Class Counsels Motion For Award Of Attorneys Fees, Costs, And Service Awards To The Named Plaintiffs, 210 MOTION to Certify Class Notice Of Motion and Motion For Final Approval Of Dungeness Crab Settlement And Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof filed byAllen Loretz. (Related document(s) 212 , 210 ) (Audet, William) (Filed on 7/2/2010) (Entered: 07/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Steven Fitz in Support of 212 MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice Of Motion, Motion, And Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Class Counsels Motion For Award Of Attorneys Fees, Costs, And Service Awards To The Named Plaintiffs, 210 MOTION to Certify Class Notice Of Motion and Motion For Final Approval Of Dungeness Crab Settlement And Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof filed byAllen Loretz. (Related document(s) 212 , 210 ) (Audet, William) (Filed on 7/2/2010) (Entered: 07/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of John Tarantino in Support of 212 MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice Of Motion, Motion, And Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Class Counsels Motion For Award Of Attorneys Fees, Costs, And Service Awards To The Named Plaintiffs, 210 MOTION to Certify Class Notice Of Motion and Motion For Final Approval Of Dungeness Crab Settlement And Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof filed byAllen Loretz. (Related document(s) 212 , 210 ) (Audet, William) (Filed on 7/2/2010) (Entered: 07/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of John Atkinson in Support of 212 MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice Of Motion, Motion, And Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Class Counsels Motion For Award Of Attorneys Fees, Costs, And Service Awards To The Named Plaintiffs, 210 MOTION to Certify Class Notice Of Motion and Motion For Final Approval Of Dungeness Crab Settlement And Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof filed byAllen Loretz. (Related document(s) 212 , 210 ) (Audet, William) (Filed on 7/2/2010) (Entered: 07/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Allen Loretz in Support of 212 MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice Of Motion, Motion, And Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Class Counsels Motion For Award Of Attorneys Fees, Costs, And Service Awards To The Named Plaintiffs, 210 MOTION to Certify Class Notice Of Motion and Motion For Final Approval Of Dungeness Crab Settlement And Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof filed byAllen Loretz. (Related document(s) 212 , 210 ) (Audet, William) (Filed on 7/2/2010) (Entered: 07/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Rachel Christman in Support of 212 MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice Of Motion, Motion, And Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Class Counsels Motion For Award Of Attorneys Fees, Costs, And Service Awards To The Named Plaintiffs, 210 MOTION to Certify Class Notice Of Motion and Motion For Final Approval Of Dungeness Crab Settlement And Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof filed byAllen Loretz. (Related document(s) 212 , 210 ) (Audet, William) (Filed on 7/2/2010) (Entered: 07/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Frank M. Pitre in Support of 212 MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice Of Motion, Motion, And Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Class Counsels Motion For Award Of Attorneys Fees, Costs, And Service Awards To The Named Plaintiffs, 210 MOTION to Certify Class Notice Of Motion and Motion For Final Approval Of Dungeness Crab Settlement And Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof filed byAllen Loretz. (Related document(s) 212 , 210 ) (Audet, William) (Filed on 7/2/2010) (Entered: 07/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of William M. Audet in Support of 212 MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice Of Motion, Motion, And Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Class Counsels Motion For Award Of Attorneys Fees, Costs, And Service Awards To The Named Plaintiffs, 210 MOTION to Certify Class Notice Of Motion and Motion For Final Approval Of Dungeness Crab Settlement And Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof filed byAllen Loretz. (Related document(s) 212 , 210 ) (Audet, William) (Filed on 7/2/2010) (Entered: 07/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Allen Loretz Plaintiff John Tarantino, Steven Fitz, Sean Hodges, And John Atkinson Joinder In Support Of (1) Class Counsels Motion For Award Of Attorneys Fees, Costs, And Service Awards To The Named Plaintiffs; And (2) Motion For Final Approval Of The Class Action Settlement (Audet, William) (Filed on 7/2/2010) (Entered: 07/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 212 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice Of Motion, Motion, And Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Class Counsels Motion For Award Of Attorneys Fees, Costs, And Service Awards To The Named Plaintiffs filed by Allen Loretz. Motion Hearing set for 9/3/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Audet, William) (Filed on 7/2/2010) (Entered: 07/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Order re 210 MOTION to Certify Class Notice Of Motion and Motion For Final Approval Of Dungeness Crab Settlement And Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof by Allen Loretz. (Audet, William) (Filed on 7/2/2010) (Entered: 07/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Certify Class Notice Of Motion and Motion For Final Approval Of Dungeness Crab Settlement And Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof filed by Allen Loretz. Motion Hearing set for 9/3/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Audet, William) (Filed on 7/2/2010) (Entered: 07/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER re Limited Intervention of State Court Plaintiffs and Filing Motion for Preliminary Approval of Dungeness Crab Settlement. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 4/21/10. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2010) (Entered: 04/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Non-Settled Claims. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 4/21/10. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2010) (Entered: 04/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 4/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting 198 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2010) (Entered: 04/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Order CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 204 by Allen Loretz. (Nadji, Adel) (Filed on 4/15/2010) (Entered: 04/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION CORRECTION OF DOCKET #203 by Allen Loretz. (Nadji, Adel) (Filed on 4/15/2010) (Entered: 04/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Order CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 204 by Allen Loretz. (Nadji, Adel) (Filed on 4/12/2010) . (Entered: 04/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT 205 . *** STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Non-Settled Claims by Allen Loretz. (Nadji, Adel) (Filed on 4/9/2010) Modified on 4/15/2010 (feriab, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT 206 . *** Proposed Order Granting 198 Preliminary Approval of Settlement and Provisional Class Certification by Allen Loretz. (Nadji, Adel) (Filed on 4/9/2010) Modified on 4/12/2010 (aaa, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/15/2010 (feriab, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Frank M. Pitre In Support of 198 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Dungeness Crab Settlement filed byAllen Loretz. (Nadji, Adel) (Filed on 4/9/2010) Modified on 4/12/2010 (aaa, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of William M. Audet In Support of 198 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Dungeness Crab Settlement filed byAllen Loretz. (Nadji, Adel) (Filed on 4/9/2010) Modified on 4/12/2010 (aaa, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Brief Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of 198 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Dungeness Crab Settlement filed byAllen Loretz. (Nadji, Adel) (Filed on 4/9/2010) Modified on 4/12/2010 (aaa, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Approval of Dungeness Crab Settlement filed by Allen Loretz. (Nadji, Adel) (Filed on 4/9/2010) (Entered: 04/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Re Limited Intervention of State Court Plaintiffs and Filing Motion For Preliminary Approval of Dungeness Crab Settlement by Allen Loretz. (Nadji, Adel) (Filed on 4/9/2010) (Entered: 04/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 3/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CLERKS NOTICE: YOU ARE NOTIFIED THAT the Further Case Management Conference set for March 19, 2010 is off calendar. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2010) (Entered: 03/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 195 Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: 1/27/2010 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti in case 3:07-cv-05800-SC; granting (90) Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting (93) Motion for Partial Summary Judgment in case 3:08-cv-02052-SC (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2010) (Entered: 01/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 12/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re: Applicability of Section 1198 (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2009) (Entered: 12/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 12/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER vacating hearing; continuing case management conference to 3/19/2010 (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2009) (Entered: 12/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 11/5/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Amended Transcript of Proceedings held on September 25, 2009, before Judge Samuel Conti. Court Reporter/Transcriber Catherine Edwards, Telephone number (510) 886-2427. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/1/2010. (djc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2009) (Entered: 11/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 11/5/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ** SEE AMENDED TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - Docket #192 ** Transcript of Proceedings held on September 25, 2009, before Judge Samuel Conti. Court Reporter/Transcriber Catherine Edwards, Telephone number (510) 886-2427. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/1/2010. (djc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2009) (Entered: 11/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 9/25/2009, Entered: 9/25/2009 Terminate Deadlines and HearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 9/25/2009 before Judge Samuel Conti (Date Filed: 9/25/2009), Motion Hearing held on 9/25/2009 before Judge Samuel Conti (Date Filed: 9/25/2009). Further Status Conference set for 12/18/2009 10:00 AM. (Court Reporter Catherine Edwards.) (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/25/2009) (Entered: 09/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 189 Filed: 9/22/2009, Entered: 9/22/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER REQUIRING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 9/21/09. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2009) (Entered: 09/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 9/18/2009, Entered: 9/18/2009 Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND PROPOSED JOINT CONSOLIDATED [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Regal Stone, Ltd.. (Walsh, Joseph) (Filed on 9/18/2009) (Entered: 09/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 9/18/2009, Entered: 9/18/2009 Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND PROPOSED JOINT CONSOLIDATED [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Fleet Management Ltd., Regal Stone, Ltd.. (Kendrick, Elizabeth) (Filed on 9/18/2009) (Entered: 09/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 9/16/2009, Entered: 9/16/2009 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting (179) Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Mark Russo in case 3:07-cv-05800-SC (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2009) (Entered: 09/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 9/3/2009, Entered: 9/3/2009 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti denying as moot (29) Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot (30) Motion to Dismiss in case 3:08-cv-05098-SC (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2009) (Entered: 09/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: 9/2/2009 Statement of Non-Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statement of Non-Opposition re 179 MOTION to Dismiss Class Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Named Plaintiff's Mark Russo of His Duties As Class Representative; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities Thereof filed byJohn Cota. (Related document(s) 179 ) (Jones, George) (Filed on 9/2/2009) (Entered: 09/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: 9/2/2009 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER Consolidating Case with Cases: C-08-5098, C-07-6045, C-07-5800, C-08-2052, AND C-08-2268. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 9/1/09. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2009) (Entered: 09/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 8/27/2009, Entered: 8/27/2009 Statement of Non-Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statement of Non-Opposition Defendants Regal Stone Limited, Fleet Management and M/V Cosco Busan's Statement of Non-Opposition to Plaintiffs' 179 Motion to Dismiss filed byFleet Management Ltd., M/V Cosco Busan, Regal Stone, Ltd.. (Taylor, Julie) (Filed on 8/27/2009) Modified on 8/28/2009 (aaa, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 8/7/2009, Entered: 8/7/2009 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                [Proposed] Order re 179 by Mark Russo. (Nadji, Adel) (Filed on 8/7/2009) Modified on 8/11/2009 (aaa, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 8/7/2009, Entered: 8/7/2009 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Adel A. Nadji In Support of Class Plaintiffs' 179 Motion to Dismiss Named Plaintiffs' Mark Russo of His Duties As Class Representative filed byMark Russo. (Nadji, Adel) (Filed on 8/7/2009) Modified on 8/11/2009 (aaa, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 8/7/2009, Entered: 8/7/2009 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss Class Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Named Plaintiff's Mark Russo of His Duties As Class Representative; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities Thereof filed by Mark Russo. Motion Hearing set for 9/25/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Nadji, Adel) (Filed on 8/7/2009) (Entered: 08/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 7/1/2009, Entered: 7/1/2009 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting in part and denying in part 172 Motion to Dismiss (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2009) (Entered: 07/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 6/18/2009, Entered: 6/18/2009 Statement of Non-Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statement of Non-Opposition re 172 MOTION to Dismiss Class Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Named Plaintiffs' Chelsea, LLC and Mark Russo of their Duties as CLass Representatives; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byJohn Cota. (Related document(s) 172 ) (Jones, George) (Filed on 6/18/2009) (Entered: 06/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 6/18/2009, Entered: 6/18/2009 Statement of Non-Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statement of Non-Opposition to Plaintiff's 172 Motion to Dismiss filed byFleet Management, Ltd., in personam, M/V Cosco Busan, Regal Stone, Ltd.. (Taylor, Julie) (Filed on 6/18/2009) Modified on 6/22/2009 (aaa, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 6/8/2009, Entered: 6/8/2009 Order on Motion to Relate CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting (170) Motion to Relate C-08-5096 and C-07-05800 (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2009) (Entered: 06/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 6/4/2009, Entered: 6/4/2009 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Order re 172 MOTION to Dismiss Class Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Named Plaintiffs' Chelsea, LLC and Mark Russo of their Duties as CLass Representatives; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof by Chelsea, LLC. (Nadji, Adel) (Filed on 6/4/2009) (Entered: 06/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 6/4/2009, Entered: 6/4/2009 Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statement Rule 23(e)(3) Statement of Adel A. Nadji in Support of Class Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss Named Plaintiffs' Chelsea, LLC and Mark Russo of their Duties as Class Representatives by Chelsea, LLC. (Nadji, Adel) (Filed on 6/4/2009) (Entered: 06/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 6/4/2009, Entered: 6/4/2009 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss Class Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Named Plaintiffs' Chelsea, LLC and Mark Russo of their Duties as CLass Representatives; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Chelsea, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 7/10/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Nadji, Adel) (Filed on 6/4/2009) (Entered: 06/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 6/3/2009, Entered: 6/3/2009 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Order re 170 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-12 and Declaration of David A Tong in Support Thereof by Fleet Management, Ltd., in personam, Regal Stone, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order granting Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related)(Walsh, Joseph) (Filed on 6/3/2009) (Entered: 06/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 6/3/2009, Entered: 6/3/2009 MOTION to Relate Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-12 and Declaration of David A Tong in Support Thereof filed by Fleet Management, Ltd., in personam, Regal Stone, Ltd.. (Walsh, Joseph) (Filed on 6/3/2009) (Entered: 06/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 4/29/2009, Entered: 4/29/2009 Terminate Deadlines and HearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER Further Conference set for 5/1/09 is continued to 9/25/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 4/29/09. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2009) (Entered: 04/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 4/28/2009, Entered: 4/28/2009 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT (Joint) Statement in Connection with Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference and Extend Stay of Cases by Fleet Management, Ltd., in personam, Regal Stone, Ltd.. (Moriarty, Anne) (Filed on 4/28/2009) (Entered: 04/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 4/28/2009, Entered: 4/28/2009 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION (Joint) to Postpone Case Management Conference and Proposed Order by Fleet Management, Ltd., in personam, Regal Stone, Ltd.. (Moriarty, Anne) (Filed on 4/28/2009) (Entered: 04/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 4/23/2009, Entered: 4/23/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by John Cota, John Cota of Firm Name Change (Jones, George) (Filed on 4/23/2009) (Entered: 04/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 4/20/2009, Entered: 4/20/2009 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 5/1/2009 10:00 AM. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2009) (Entered: 04/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: 4/17/2009 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Granting Withdrawal of Attorney Anthony M. Urie for Plaintiffs (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2009) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 4/16/2009, Entered: 4/16/2009 Order on Motion to Relate CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting (161) Motion to Relate Case C-09-1469-SBA to C-07-5800-SC (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2009) (Entered: 04/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 4/15/2009, Entered: 4/15/2009 Notice of Change In Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE and [PROPOSED] ORDER of Change In Counsel by Anthony Martin Urie Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel (Urie, Anthony) (Filed on 4/15/2009) Modified on 4/16/2009 (aaa, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 4/6/2009, Entered: 4/6/2009 MOTION to Relate Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Relate Case filed by Synergy Maritime, Ltd. In Personam, Fleet Management, Ltd., in personam, Regal Stone, Ltd.. (Young, Gordon) (Filed on 4/6/2009) (Entered: 04/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 3/23/2009, Entered: 3/23/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Granting 84 Substitution of Counsel. Attorney Marc J. Derewetzky for RLI Insurance Company added. Attorney Julia Ann Molander terminated.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 3/20/09. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2009) (Entered: 03/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 2/3/2009, Entered: 2/3/2009 Order on Motion to Consolidate CasesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting (156) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 3:07-cv-05800-SC; granting (130) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 3:07-cv-06045-SC; granting (78) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 3:08-cv-02052-SC; granting (44) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 3:08-cv-02268-SC; granting (16) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 3:08-cv-05098-SC (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2009) (Entered: 02/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: 1/22/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Fleet Management, Ltd., in personam, Regal Stone, Ltd. re 156 MOTION to Consolidate Cases NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF JANUARY 23, 2009 HEARINGS (Stecher, Christopher) (Filed on 1/22/2009) (Entered: 01/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 1/20/2009, Entered: 1/20/2009 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Answer to Amended Complaint 117 Amended Complaint, (Second Amended) byJohn Cota. (Coppenrath, Walter) (Filed on 1/20/2009) (Entered: 01/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 12/19/2008, Entered: 12/19/2008 Motion to Consolidate Cases
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Fleet Management, Ltd., in personam, Regal Stone, Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 1/23/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Young, Gordon) (Filed on 12/19/2008) (Entered: 12/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 12/9/2008, Entered: 12/9/2008 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CLERKS NOTICE taking the Case Management Conference set for 12/12/08 OFF CALENDAR. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2008) (Entered: 12/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 12/5/2008, Entered: 12/5/2008 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (ADR Certification by Parties and Counsel) (Bussi, Nicole) (Filed on 12/5/2008) (Entered: 12/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 12/5/2008, Entered: 12/5/2008 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (ADR Certification by Parties and Counsel) (Bussi, Nicole) (Filed on 12/5/2008) (Entered: 12/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 12/4/2008, Entered: 12/4/2008 Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by M/V Cosco Busan, Fleet Management, Ltd., in personam, Regal Stone, Ltd.. (Moriarty, Anne) (Filed on 12/4/2008) (Entered: 12/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 11/25/2008, Entered: 11/25/2008 Order on Motion to Relate CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting (148) Motion to Relate Case C-08-5098 to C-07-cv-05800-SC (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2008) (Entered: 11/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: 11/18/2008 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Chelsea, LLC. Service waived by John Cota waiver sent on 11/18/2008, answer due 1/20/2009. "Waiver of the Service of Summons" (Nadji, Adel) (Filed on 11/18/2008) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: 11/18/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher A. Stecher (Stecher, Christopher) (Filed on 11/18/2008) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: 11/18/2008 MOTION to Relate Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Relate Case Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-12 filed by M/V Cosco Busan, Fleet Management, Ltd., in personam, Regal Stone, Ltd.. (Stecher, Christopher) (Filed on 11/18/2008) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: 11/17/2008 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by M/V Cosco Busan, Fleet Management, Ltd., in personam, Regal Stone, Ltd. re 148 administrative motion, 146 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER RELATING CASE PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 3-12 (Stecher, Christopher) (Filed on 11/17/2008) Modified on 11/18/2008 (aaa, Court Staff). (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: 11/17/2008 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Order re 148 Brief, [PROPOSED] ORDER RELATING CASE PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 3-12 by M/V Cosco Busan, Fleet Management, Ltd., in personam, Regal Stone, Ltd.. (Stecher, Christopher) (Filed on 11/17/2008) Modified on 11/18/2008 (aaa, Court Staff). (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: 11/17/2008 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ERRONEOUSLY POSTED: COUNSEL TO RE-POST DOCUMENT AS AN ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO RELATE CASES: Brief Defendants Regal Stone Limited, Fleet Management Ltd., and M/V Cosco Busan's Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-12 filed byM/V Cosco Busan, Fleet Management, Ltd., in personam, Regal Stone, Ltd.. (Stecher, Christopher) (Filed on 11/17/2008) Modified on 11/18/2008 (aaa, Court Staff). (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 11/13/2008, Entered: 11/13/2008 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry: Expedited Motion to Compel held on 11/13/2008 before Judge Samuel Conti (Date Filed: 11/13/2008). (Court Reporter Katherine Wyatt.) (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/13/2008) (Entered: 11/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 10/3/2008, Entered: 10/3/2008 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint 2nd Amended byHanjin Shipping, Co., Ltd.. (Wise, Erich) (Filed on 10/3/2008) (Entered: 10/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 9/30/2008, Entered: 9/30/2008 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER Order Extending Hanjin Shipping's Time to File and Serve a Response to Plaintiffs' Verified Second Amended Class Action Complaint. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 9/29/08. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2008) (Entered: 09/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 9/26/2008, Entered: 9/26/2008 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION and Proposed Order Extending Time to File and Serve a Response to Plaintiffs' Verified Second Amended Class Action Complaint by Hanjin Shipping, Co., Ltd.. (Wise, Erich) (Filed on 9/26/2008) (Entered: 09/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 9/19/2008, Entered: 9/19/2008 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Hanjin Shipping Co., Ltd.'s Time to File and Serve a Response to Plaintiffs' Verified Second Amended Class Action Complaint. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 9/19/08. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2008) (Entered: 09/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 9/19/2008, Entered: 9/19/2008 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Answer to Amended Complaint byM/V Cosco Busan, Fleet Management, Ltd., in personam, Regal Stone, Ltd.. (Giffin, John) (Filed on 9/19/2008) (Entered: 09/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 9/19/2008, Entered: 9/19/2008 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Answer to Amended Complaint byM/V Cosco Busan, Fleet Management, Ltd., in personam, Regal Stone, Ltd.. (Giffin, John) (Filed on 9/19/2008) (Entered: 09/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 134 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Hanjin Shippings Time to File and Serve a Response to Plaintiffs' Verified Second Amended Class Action Complaint.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 9/8/08. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 9/19/2008, Entered: 9/19/2008 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Answer to Amended Complaint byM/V Cosco Busan, Fleet Management, Ltd., in personam, Regal Stone, Ltd.. (Giffin, John) (Filed on 9/19/2008) (Entered: 09/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 133 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending M/V Cosco Busan, Fleet Management, Ltd., in personam and Regal Stones Time for Filing and Service a Response to Plaintiff's Verified Second Amended Class Action Complaint. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 9/8/08. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 9/19/2008, Entered: 9/19/2008 Order on Motion to StayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting (33) Motion to Stay in civil case 3:08-cv-02052-SC (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2008) (Entered: 09/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 132 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: 9/5/2008 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER To Further Extend the Time to File and Serve a Response to Plaintiffs' Verified Second Amended Class Action Complaint by Hanjin Shipping, Co., Ltd.. (Wise, Erich) (Filed on 9/5/2008) Modified on 9/9/2008 (aaa, Court Staff).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 9/18/2008, Entered: 9/18/2008 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION and Proposed Order Extending Hanjin Shipping Co., Ltd.'s Time to File and Serve a Response to Plaintiffs' Verified Second Amended Class Action Complaint by Hanjin Shipping, Co., Ltd.. (Wise, Erich) (Filed on 9/18/2008) (Entered: 09/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 131 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: 9/5/2008 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION of Parties to Extend the Time for Filing and Service of a Response to Plaintiff's Verified Second Amended Class Action Complaint and Proposed Order by M/V Cosco Busan, Fleet Management, Ltd., in personam, Regal Stone, Ltd.. (Moriarty, Anne) (Filed on 9/5/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 130 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: 9/5/2008 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION of Parties to Extend the Time for Filing and Service of a Response to Plaintiff's Verified Second Amended Class Action Complaint and Proposed Order by M/V Cosco Busan, Fleet Management, Ltd., in personam, Regal Stone, Ltd.. (Moriarty, Anne) (Filed on 9/5/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 129 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: 9/3/2008 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CLERK'S NOTICE Further Case Management Conference set for 9/5/08 is continued to 12/12/2008 10:00 AM. the hearing scheduled for September 5, 2008, on the Motion to Stay Civil Action Pending Resolution of Criminal Proceeding, Or, Alternatively, To Compel Arbitration, filed by Defendant John Cota, is hereby VACATED. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 128 Filed: 8/29/2008, Entered: 8/29/2008 Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT "Joint Case Management Statement" filed by Chelsea, LLC. (Nadji, Adel) (Filed on 8/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 127 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: 8/27/2008 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER To Further Extend the time for Defendant Hanjin Shipping Co. to File and Serve a Response to Plaintiffs Verified Second Amended Class Action Complaint. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 8/26/08. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 126 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: 8/27/2008 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER of Plaintiffs and Defendants to Extend the Time for Filing and Service of a Response to Plaintiffs' Verified Second Amended Class Action Complaint. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 8/26/08. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 125 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: 8/26/2008 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION TO FURTHER EXTEND THE TIME FOR FILING AND SERVICE OF A RESPONSE TO PLAINTFFS VERIFIED SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON by Hanjin Shipping, Co., Ltd.. (Wise, Erich) (Filed on 8/26/2008) Modified on 8/27/2008 (aaa, Court Staff).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 124 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER of Plaintiffs and Defendants to Extend the Time for Filing and Service of a Response to Plaintiffs' Verified Second Amended Class Action Complaint and Proposed Order by M/V Cosco Busan, Fleet Management, Ltd., in personam, Regal Stone, Ltd. (Moriarty, Anne) (Filed on 8/21/2008) Modified on 8/22/2008 (aaa, Court Staff).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 123 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: 8/14/2008 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Defendants Time for Filing and Service of a Response to Plaintiff's Verified Second Amended Class Action Complaint. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 8/14/08. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 122 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: 8/13/2008 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION of Plaintiffs and Defendants to Extend the Time for Filing and Service of a Response to Plaintiff's Verified Second Amended Class Action Complaint and Proposed Order by M/V Cosco Busan, Fleet Management, Ltd., in personam, Regal Stone, Ltd.. (Moriarty, Anne) (Filed on 8/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 121 Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: 8/8/2008 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Dismissing Case C-07-5926 and interested party Domonic Dapetti in C-07-5800., Attorney Cory A. Birnberg terminated. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 120 Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: 8/6/2008 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND THE TIME FOR FILING AND SERVICE OF A RESPONSE TO PLAINTFFS VERIFIED SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 8/5/08. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 119 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: 8/5/2008 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal F/V Gladnik, LLC, F/V Midori, LLC; F/V Charlie D,, LLC; F/V Donita, LLC; F/V Inrepid,Inc.; Bradford Floyd; Danny Murray; Domonic Dapetti; Chad Dahlberg by Domonic Dapetti (Birnberg, Cory) (Filed on 8/5/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 118 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: 8/5/2008 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION TO EXTEND THE TIME FOR FILING AND SERVICE OF A RESPONSE TO PLAINTFFS VERIFIED SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON by Hanjin Shipping, Co., Ltd.. (Wise, Erich) (Filed on 8/5/2008) Modified on 8/6/2008 (aaa, Court Staff).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 117 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: 7/29/2008 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT "Verified Second Amended Class Action Complaint for Damages and Equitable Relief" against John Cota, Synergy Maritime, Ltd. In Personam, M/V Cosco Busan, Fleet Management, Ltd., in personam, Regal Stone, Ltd., Hanjin Shipping, Co., Ltd.. Filed byChelsea, LLC. (Nadji, Adel) (Filed on 7/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 116 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: 7/22/2008 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting (100) Motion for Leave to File in case 3:07-cv-05800-SC (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 115 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CLERK'S NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 7/25/08 is continued to 9/5/2008 10:00 AM. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 114 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: 7/18/2008 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of Interested Entities by M/V Cosco Busan, Regal Stone, Ltd. (Regal Stone and M/V Cosco Busan's Form of Certification) (Bussi, Nicole) (Filed on 7/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 113 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: 7/17/2008 Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT "Joint Case Manangement Statement" filed by Chelsea, LLC. (Nadji, Adel) (Filed on 7/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 112 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: 7/11/2008 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Change of Address by John D. Giffin (Giffin, John) (Filed on 7/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 111 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: 7/11/2008 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE [110] by Chelsea, LLC (Nadji, Adel) (Filed on 7/11/2008) Modified on 7/14/2008 (sis, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 110 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: 7/11/2008 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendant Regal Stone's " Non-Opposition" and Response to Motion for Leave to Amend Verified First Amended Complaint filed byChelsea, LLC. (Nadji, Adel) (Filed on 7/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 109 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Anne M. Moriarty in Support of Defendant's [108] Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Verified First Amended Complaint filed byRegal Stone, Ltd.. (Giffin, John) (Filed on 7/3/2008) Modified on 7/7/2008 (aaa, Court Staff).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 108 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008 Response in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Support to Plaintiffs' [100] Motion for Leave to Amend Verified First Amended Complaint filed byRegal Stone, Ltd.. (Giffin, John) (Filed on 7/3/2008) Modified on 7/7/2008 (aaa, Court Staff).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 107 Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: 6/24/2008 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CLERK'S NOTICE in C-08-2268 Case Management Conference set for 7/25/2008 10:00 AM. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 106 Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: 6/23/2008 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CORRECTED STIPULATION AND ORDER RELATING CIVIL CASES ONLY. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 6/19/08. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 105 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: 6/19/2008 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER Relating Cases. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 6/19/08. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 104 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: 6/18/2008 Order Relating CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER RELATING CASE.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 6/18/08. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 103 Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: 6/16/2008 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chelsea, LLC re [100] MOTION for Leave to File "Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Amend Verified First Amended Complaint, Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof (Nadji, Adel) (Filed on 6/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 102 Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: 6/16/2008 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Order re [100] MOTION for Leave to File "Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Amend Verified First Amended Complaint, Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof " [Proposed] Order Granting Plaintiffs Leave to Amend Verified First Amended Complaint" by Chelsea, LLC. (Nadji, Adel) (Filed on 6/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 101 Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: 6/16/2008 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of William M. Audet in Support of [100] MOTION for Leave to File "Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Amend Verified First Amended Complaint, Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof "Declaration of William M. Audet in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend Verified First Amended Complaint" filed byChelsea, LLC. (Related document(s)[100]) (Nadji, Adel) (Filed on 6/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 100 Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: 6/16/2008, Terminated: 7/22/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File "Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Amend Verified First Amended Complaint, Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Chelsea, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 7/25/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Nadji, Adel) (Filed on 6/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 99 Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: 6/16/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ERRONEOUSLY POSTED: COUNSEL TO RE-POST AN ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO RELATE CASES NOTICE by Regal Stone, Ltd. of Related Case: Stipulation Thereon (Giffin, John) (Filed on 6/16/2008) Modified on 6/17/2008 (aaa, Court Staff).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 98 Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: 6/13/2008 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT --FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF, INDEMNITY AND REIMBURSEMENT-- against John Joseph Cota, Regal Stone Limited, Fleet Management Ltd., M/V Cosco Busan. Filed byThe Continental Insurance Company. (Ruby, Samuel) (Filed on 6/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 97 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: 5/12/2008 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter from Jonathan Howden to Judge Samuel Conti. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 96 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: 5/9/2008 Terminate Deadlines and HearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry: Plaintiffs Motion to take the Depositions of Cosco Busan Crew Members Shun Biao, Zhao, Kong Xiang Hu, Liang Xian Zheng was argued. on 5/9/2008 before Judge Samuel Conti (Date Filed: 5/9/2008). (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn.) (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/9/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 95 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: 5/9/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Transcript of Proceedings held on April 25, 2008, before Senior Judge Samuel Conti. Court Reporter Juanita Gonzalez. (aaa, Court Staff) (Filed on 5/8/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 94 Filed: 5/7/2008, Entered: 5/7/2008 Order on Ex Parte ApplicationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti Require Appearance of Cosco Busan Crew Members Shun Biao Zhao, Kong Xiang Hu, Liang Xian Zheng & Their Counsel At Case Management Conference on 5/9/08 at 10:00 a.m. Courtroom #1 17th Floor(tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 93 Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: 5/6/2008 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT re [90] Affidavit (Supplemental) of Cynthia Hudson by M/V Cosco Busan, Fleet Management, Ltd., in personam, Regal Stone, Ltd.. (Giffin, John) (Filed on 5/6/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 92 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: 5/5/2008 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CLERK'S NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 7/25/2008 10:00 AM. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 91 Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: 5/2/2008 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CLERK'S NOTICE taking the sanctions hearing set for 5/5/08 off calendar. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 90 Filed: 5/1/2008, Entered: 5/1/2008 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT re [89] Affidavit of Cynthia Hudson by M/V Cosco Busan, Fleet Management, Ltd., in personam, Regal Stone, Ltd.. (Giffin, John) (Filed on 5/1/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 89 Filed: 5/1/2008, Entered: 5/1/2008 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of John Giffin in Support of Compliance with Court's Order by Fleet Management, Ltd., in personam, M/V Cosco Busan, Regal Stone, Ltd.. (Giffin, John) (Filed on 5/1/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 88 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: 4/25/2008 Order on Motion to Relate CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting in part and denying in part (85) Motion to Relate Case in case 3:07-cv-05800-SC; granting in part and denying in part (4) Motion to Relate Case in case 3:08-cv-02052-SI. C-08-2052-SI is related and CR-08-160-JCS is not related. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 87 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: 4/25/2008 Terminate Deadlines and HearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry: Case Management Conference held on 4/25/2008 before Judge Samuel Conti (Date Filed: 4/25/2008). (Court Reporter Juanita Gonzalez.) (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 86 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: 4/25/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Re Defendants' Communication With Putative Class Members. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 4/25/2008. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 85 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: 4/21/2008, Terminated: 4/25/2008 MOTION to Relate Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Relate Case filed by The Continental Insurance Co.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Proposed order)(Ruby, Samuel) (Filed on 4/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 84 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: 4/15/2008 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration in Support of [83] Case Management Statement Declaration of Adel A. Nadji Re: Supplemental Case Management Statement Exhibits filed byChelsea, LLC. (Related document(s)[83]) (Nadji, Adel) (Filed on 4/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 83 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: 4/15/2008 Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Cover Letter and Attached February 22, 2008 Case Management Statement for the April 25, 2008 Case Management Conference filed by Chelsea, LLC. (Nadji, Adel) (Filed on 4/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 82 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: 3/3/2008 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendant's ANSWER to Amended Complaint byHanjin Shipping, Co., Ltd.. (Wise, Erich) (Filed on 3/3/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 81 Filed: 2/22/2008, Entered: 2/25/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on February 22, 2008 before Senior Judge Samuel Conti. Court Reporter: Belle Ball. (aaa, Court Staff) (Filed on 2/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 80 Filed: 2/22/2008, Entered: 2/22/2008 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED Minute Entry: Status Conference (Date Filed: 2/22/2008). (Court Reporter Belle Ball.) (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 79 Filed: 2/22/2008, Entered: 2/22/2008 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry: Status Conference - Held (Date Filed: 2/22/2008), ***Motions terminated: (39 in 3:07-cv-05800-SC) MOTION for Order to Show Cause Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Order to Show Cause Why a Protective Order To Supervise or Otherwise Limit Communications with Putative Class Members Should Not Issue filed by Chelsea, LLC.. Further Status Conference set for 4/25/2008 10:00 AM. (Court Reporter Belle Ball.) (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 78 Filed: 2/22/2008, Entered: 2/22/2008 Clerks Notice re: Failure to E-File and Register
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CLERK'S NOTICE to Plaintiff(s) Attorney(s) by e-mail or U.S. mail re: Failure to E-File/E-Mail re [77] Notice of Appearance and/or Failure to Register as an E-Filer (aaa, Court Staff) (Filed on 2/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 77 Filed: 2/22/2008, Entered: 2/22/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance Chelsea, LLC (aaa, Court Staff) (Filed on 2/22/2008) (aaa, Court Staff).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 76 Filed: 2/22/2008, Entered: 2/22/2008 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant Regal Stone, Ltd's Answer ANSWER to Complaint byRegal Stone, Ltd.. (Taylor, Julie) (Filed on 2/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 75 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008 Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT - Plaintiffs Bradford Floyd, Danny Murray, And Domonic Dapetti's Status Conference Statement filed by Domonic Dapetti. (Birnberg, Cory) (Filed on 2/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 74 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: 2/15/2008 Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Chelsea, LLC. (Nadji, Adel) (Filed on 2/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 73 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: 2/14/2008 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chelsea, LLC. NSB Neiderelbe served on 2/8/2008, answer due 2/28/2008. Notice of Filing Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint Defendant NSB Neiderelbe (Nadji, Adel) (Filed on 2/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 72 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: 2/14/2008 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chelsea, LLC. Conti Cairo KG served on 2/8/2008, answer due 2/28/2008. Notice of Filing Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint Defendant Conti Cairo KG (Nadji, Adel) (Filed on 2/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 71 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: 2/14/2008 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chelsea, LLC. M/V Cosco Busan served on 2/8/2008, answer due 2/28/2008. Notice of Filing Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint Defendant Cosco Busan (Nadji, Adel) (Filed on 2/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 70 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: 2/13/2008 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chelsea, LLC Notice of Filing Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint Defendant Regal Stone, LTD., SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chelsea, LLC. (Nadji, Adel) (Filed on 2/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 69 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: 2/13/2008 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Claimant to Vessel Regal Stone, Ltd. Making a Restricted Appearance to ANSWER to Amended Complaint byM/V Cosco Busan, Regal Stone, Ltd.. (Giffin, John) (Filed on 2/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 68 Filed: 2/12/2008, Entered: 2/12/2008 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chelsea, LLC CLERK'S NOTICE: PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY A PROTECTIVE ORDER TO SUPERVISE OR OTHERWISE LIMIT COMMUNICATIONS WITH PUTATIVE CLASS MEMBERS SHOULD NOT ISSUE IS SET FOR 2/22/2008 10:00 AM. (Nadji, Adel) (Filed on 2/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 67 Filed: 2/12/2008, Entered: 2/12/2008 Clerks Notice Continuing Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CLERK'S NOTICE: Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Order to Show Cause Why a Protective Order To Supervise or Otherwise Limit Communications with Putative Class Members Should Not Issue is set for 2/22/2008 10:00 AM. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 66 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: 2/7/2008 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chelsea, LLC. Notice of Filing Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint as to Hanjin Shipping, Co., Ltd. Defendant (Nadji, Adel) (Filed on 2/7/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 65 Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: 2/6/2008 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND ORDER DISMISSING Stephen Melz; Bob Silva; Patrick Davis and Gale Force Inc, without prejudice, terminated. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 64 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: 2/5/2008 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of John D. Giffin in Support of [63] Reply to Response to Motion, Declaration of John Giffin in Support of Regal Stone Ltd.'s Response to the United States' Reply/Response to Regal Stone Ltd.'s Opposition to Ex Parte Motion for An Order to Show Cause filed byRegal Stone, Ltd.. (Related document(s)[63]) (Taylor, Julie) (Filed on 2/5/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 63 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: 2/5/2008 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion Regal Stone Ltd's [56] Response to the United States' Reply/Response to Regal Stone Ltd.'s Opposition to Ex Parte Motion fo an Order to Show Cause filed byRegal Stone, Ltd.. (Taylor, Julie) (Filed on 2/5/2008) Modified on 2/6/2008 (aaa, Court Staff).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 62 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: 2/5/2008 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal PLAINTIFFS SHOGREN LIVING TRUST; PATRICK DAVIS;STEPHEN MELZ; BOB SILVA; AND GALE FORCE, INC by Domonic Dapetti (Birnberg, Cory) (Filed on 2/5/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 61 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: 2/4/2008 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chelsea, LLC (Nadji, Adel) (Filed on 2/4/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 60 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: 2/4/2008 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Order Proposed Protective Order to Supervise and Limit Communications with Putative Class Members by Hudson Marine and the Defendants by Chelsea, LLC. (Nadji, Adel) (Filed on 2/4/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 59 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: 2/4/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in Opposition Plaintiffs' Opposition to Regal Stone Ltd.'s Objections to the Evidence Submitted In Support of Plaintiffs' [39] Motion For Order To Show Cause and Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike John G. Young Declaration filed byChelsea, LLC. (Nadji, Adel) (Filed on 2/4/2008) Modified on 2/5/2008 (aaa, Court Staff).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 58 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: 2/4/2008 Reply to Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Reply to Opposition Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum In Further Support Of Issuance Of An Order To Show Cause filed byChelsea, LLC. (Nadji, Adel) (Filed on 2/4/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 57 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: 2/4/2008 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PLAINTIFF ROSE MARIE, INC.'S DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL, (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 56 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: 2/1/2008 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re [39] MOTION for Order to Show Cause Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Order to Show Cause Why a Protective Order To Supervise or Otherwise Limit Communications with Putative Class Members Should Not Issue -- Reply/Response of United States, Plaintiff in Related Case Number C-07-6045 SC, to Representations and/or Statements of Law by Defendant Regal Stone in Opposition to Motion for an Order to Show Cause in related Case Number C-07-5800 SC filed byUnited States Of America. (Underhill, R.) (Filed on 2/1/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 55 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: 2/1/2008 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Defedant Hanjin Shipping's time to response to Plaintiff's complaint.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 2/1/08. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 54 Filed: 1/31/2008, Entered: 1/31/2008 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR FILING AND SERVICE OF A RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON by Hanjin Shipping, Co., Ltd. (Cicala, Conte) (Filed on 1/31/2008) Modified on 2/1/2008 (aaa, Court Staff).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 53 Filed: 1/28/2008, Entered: 1/28/2008 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal - Plaintiff Rose Marie, Inc.s Dismissal Without Prejudice by Domonic Dapetti (Birnberg, Cory) (Filed on 1/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 52 Filed: 1/23/2008, Entered: 1/23/2008 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Order re [50] Declaration in Opposition, [51] Objection, [47] Memorandum in Opposition, [49] Declaration in Opposition, [48] Declaration in Opposition, [Proposed] Order Denying Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Motion for Order to Show Cause Why a Protective Order to Supervise or Otherwise Limit Communications with Putative Class Members Should Not Issue by Regal Stone, Ltd.. (Taylor, Julie) (Filed on 1/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 51 Filed: 1/23/2008, Entered: 1/23/2008 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OBJECTIONS to re [50] Declaration in Opposition, [47] Memorandum in Opposition, [49] Declaration in Opposition, [48] Declaration in Opposition, Regal Stone's Objection to the "Evidence" Submitted in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Order to Show Cause Why a Protective Order to Supervise or Otherwise Limit Communications with Putative Class Members Should Not Issue by Regal Stone, Ltd.. (Taylor, Julie) (Filed on 1/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 50 Filed: 1/23/2008, Entered: 1/23/2008 Declaration in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of John G. Young in Opposition to [47] Memorandum in Opposition, [49] Declaration in Opposition, [48] Declaration in Opposition, Plaintiffs' Motion for Order to Show Cause Why a Protective Order to Supervise or Otherwise Limit Communications with Putative Class Members Should Not Issue filed byRegal Stone, Ltd.. (Related document(s)[47], [49], [48]) (Taylor, Julie) (Filed on 1/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 49 Filed: 1/23/2008, Entered: 1/23/2008 Declaration in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Michael Duncheon in Opposition to [47] Memorandum in Opposition, [48] Declaration in Opposition, Plaintiffs' Motion for Order to Show Cause Why a Protective Order to Supervise or Otherwise Limit Communications with Putative Class Members Should Not Issue filed byRegal Stone, Ltd.. (Related document(s)[47], [48]) (Taylor, Julie) (Filed on 1/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 48 Filed: 1/23/2008, Entered: 1/23/2008 Declaration in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Cynthia Hudson in Opposition to [47] Memorandum in Opposition, Plaintiffs' Motion for Order to Show Cause Why a Protective Order to Supervise or Otherwise Limit Communications with Putative Class Members Should Not Issue filed byRegal Stone, Ltd.. (Related document(s)[47]) (Taylor, Julie) (Filed on 1/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 47 Filed: 1/23/2008, Entered: 1/23/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' [39] Ex Parte Motion for Order to Show Cause Why a Protective Order to Supervise or Otherwise Limit Communications with Putative Class Members Should Not Issue filed byRegal Stone, Ltd.. (Taylor, Julie) (Filed on 1/23/2008) Modified on 1/24/2008 (aaa, Court Staff).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 46 Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: 1/17/2008 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re [39], [40], [41], [42], [43], [44], [45] & [46] by Chelsea, LLC (Nadji, Adel) (Filed on 1/17/2008) Modified on 1/18/2008 (aaa, Court Staff).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 45 Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: 1/17/2008 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                [Proposed] Order to Show Cause Why A Protective Order to Supervise and Limit Communications With Putative Class Members Should Not Issuere [39] by Chelsea, LLC. (Nadji, Adel) (Filed on 1/17/2008) Modified on 1/18/2008 (aaa, Court Staff).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 44 Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: 1/17/2008 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Steven F. Fitz in Support of Plaintiffs' Ex Parte [39] Motion for an Order to Show Cause Why a Protective Order to Supervise and Limit Communications With Putative Class Members Should Not Issue filed byChelsea, LLC. (Nadji, Adel) (Filed on 1/17/2008) Modified on 1/18/2008 (aaa, Court Staff).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 43 Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: 1/17/2008 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of John Tarantino in Support of Plaintiffs' Ex Parte [39] - -Motion for an Order to Show Cause Why a Protective Order to Supervise and Limit Communications with Putative Class Members Should Not Issue filed byChelsea, LLC. (Nadji, Adel) (Filed on 1/17/2008) Modified on 1/18/2008 (aaa, Court Staff).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 42 Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: 1/17/2008 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Frank M. Pitre in Support of [39] Motion for Order to Show Cause Why a Protective Order to Supervise and Limit Communications With Putative Class Members Should Not Issue filed byChelsea, LLC. (Nadji, Adel) (Filed on 1/17/2008) Modified on 1/18/2008 (aaa, Court Staff).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 41 Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: 1/17/2008 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of William M. Audet in Support of Plaintiffs' Ex Parte [39] Motion for Order to Show Cause Why a Protective Order To Supervise or Otherwise Limit Communications with Putatuve Class Members Should Not Issue filed byChelsea, LLC. (Nadji, Adel) (Filed on 1/17/2008) Modified on 1/18/2008 (aaa, Court Staff).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 40 Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: 1/17/2008 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum In Support Of Plaintiffs' [39] Motion For Order To Show Cause Why A Protective Order To Supervise Or Otherwise Limit Communications With Putative Class Members Should Not Issue filed byChelsea, LLC. (Nadji, Adel) (Filed on 1/17/2008) Modified on 1/18/2008 (aaa, Court Staff).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 39 Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: 1/17/2008, Terminated: 2/22/2008 ~Motion for Order to Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Order to Show Cause Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Order to Show Cause Why a Protective Order To Supervise or Otherwise Limit Communications with Putative Class Members Should Not Issue filed by Chelsea, LLC. (Nadji, Adel) (Filed on 1/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 38 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: 1/15/2008 Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CLAIM Restricted Appearance byRegal Stone, Ltd.. (Giffin, John) (Filed on 1/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 37 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: 1/15/2008 Claim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CLAIM to Vessel by Owner byRegal Stone, Ltd.. (Giffin, John) (Filed on 1/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 36 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: 12/13/2007 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CLERK'S NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 2/22/2008 10:00 AM. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 35 Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: 12/11/2007 Order on Motion to Relate CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting [29] and [30] Motions to Relate Cases C-07-5800-SC, C-07-5926-JL, C-07-6045 SI. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 34 Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: 12/6/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in Opposition re [30] MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related Pursuant to Civil L.R. 312 and 711 filed byDomonic Dapetti. (Birnberg, Cory) (Filed on 12/6/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 32 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: 12/3/2007 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chelsea, LLC Re [30] & [31] (Audet, William) (Filed on 12/3/2007) Modified on 12/4/2007 (aaa, Court Staff).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 31 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: 12/3/2007 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting [30] Administrative Motion to Relate Cases Pursuant to L.R. 3-12 and 7-11 by Chelsea, LLC. (Audet, William) (Filed on 12/3/2007) Modified on 12/4/2007 (aaa, Court Staff).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 30 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: 12/3/2007, Terminated: 12/11/2007 MOTION to Relate Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related Pursuant to Civil L.R. 312 and 711 filed by Chelsea, LLC. (Audet, William) (Filed on 12/3/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 29 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: 12/3/2007, Terminated: 12/11/2007 MOTION to Relate Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Relate Case filed by United States Of America, United States of American/ENRD. (Underhill, R.) (Filed on 12/3/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 28 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 11/30/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Robert O'Brien on Behalf of the United States of America (O'Brien, Bradley) (Filed on 11/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 27 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 11/30/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ERRONEOUSLY POSTED NOTICE by United States Of America of Related Case (Underhill, R.) (Filed on 11/30/2007) Modified on 12/3/2007 (aaa, Court Staff).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 12/3/2007 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Number [27] Notice of Related Case was erroneously posted. Counsel are requested to repost the Notice as an Administrative Motion to Relate Cases. (aaa, Court Staff) (Filed on 11/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 26 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: 11/28/2007 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chelsea, LLC re [24] Declaration in Support, [25] Proposed Order, [23] First Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Application for Entry of Initial Case Management Order) (Audet, William) (Filed on 11/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 25 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: 11/28/2007 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Order re [24] Declaration in Support, [23] First Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Application for Entry of Initial Case Management Order) ([Proposed] Initial Case Management Order) by Chelsea, LLC. (Audet, William) (Filed on 11/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 24 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: 11/28/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration in Support of [23] First Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Application for Entry of Initial Case Management Order) (Declaration of Plaintiffs' Counsel William M. Audet In Support of Ex Parte Application for Entry of an Initial Case Management Order) filed byChelsea, LLC. (Related document(s)[23]) (Audet, William) (Filed on 11/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 23 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: 11/28/2007, Terminated: 12/11/2007 Exparte Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            First Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Application for Entry of Initial Case Management Order) filed by Chelsea, LLC. (Audet, William) (Filed on 11/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 22 Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: 11/27/2007 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT (Affidavit of Buck Fowler, Jr.) by Chelsea, LLC. (Audet, William) (Filed on 11/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 33 Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: 12/4/2007 Summons Returned Unexecuted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Summons Returned Unexecuted by Chelsea, LLC as to Regal Stone, Ltd., Hanjin Shipping, Co., Ltd., China Ocean Shipping Company. (aaa, Court Staff) (Filed on 11/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 21 Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 Warrant IssuedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  WARRANT For Arrest issued. Signed by Judge Samueul Conti on 11/20/07. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 20 Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 Order on Ex Parte ApplicationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting [11] Ex Parte Application Appointing Marine Lenders Services, LLC as Substitute Custodian and Permitting Movement of Vessel, Offloading of Cargo and Inspection of Defendant Vessel (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 19 Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 Order on Ex Parte ApplicationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting [10] Ex Parte Application for Arrest of the Vessel Cosco Busan (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 18 Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 11/20/2007 before Judge Samuel Conti (Date Filed: 11/20/2007). (Court Reporter Jim Yeomans.) (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 Summons Reissued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Summons Reissued as to Chelsea, LLC. Conti Cairo KG; Neiderelbe, Synergy Maritime. Ltd. In Personma; M/V Cosco Busan, their engines, tackle, equipment, appurtenances, freights, and cargo In Rem (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 17 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Chelsea, LLC of Action and Arrest [10] (Nadji, Adel) (Filed on 11/19/2007) Modified on 11/20/2007 (sv, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 16 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Chelsea, LLC Warrant for Arrest [10] (Nadji, Adel) (Filed on 11/19/2007) Modified on 11/20/2007 (sv, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 15 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Order Authorizing Issue of Warrant of Arrest of Vessel [10] by Chelsea, LLC. (Nadji, Adel) (Filed on 11/19/2007) Modified on 11/20/2007 (sv, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 14 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Order Appointing Marine Lenders Services, LLC as Substitute Custodian and Permitting Movement of Vessel, Offloading of Cargo and Inspection of Defendant Vessel [11] by Chelsea, LLC. (Nadji, Adel) (Filed on 11/19/2007) Modified on 11/20/2007 (sv, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 13 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT [11]Certification of Buck Fowler, Jr. by Chelsea, LLC. (Nadji, Adel) (Filed on 11/19/2007) Modified on 11/20/2007 (sv, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 12 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of William M. Audet in Support of Ex Parte Application for Arrest of Vessel Cosco Busan [10] filed by Chelsea, LLC. (Nadji, Adel) (Filed on 11/19/2007) Modified on 11/20/2007 (sv, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 11 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007, Terminated: 11/20/2007 Exparte Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Ex Parte Application to Appoint Substitute Custodian filed by Chelsea, LLC. (Nadji, Adel) (Filed on 11/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 10 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007, Terminated: 11/20/2007 Exparte Application
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Ex Parte Application for Arrest of the Vessel Cosco Busan Pursuant to Rule C of the Supplemental Admiralty Rules and Admir. L.R. 3 filed by Chelsea, LLC. (Nadji, Adel) (Filed on 11/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 9 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Chelsea, LLC of Request for Judicial Review in Accordance with F.R.C.P. Supplemental Rule C (Nadji, Adel) (Filed on 11/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 8 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Samuel Conti for all further proceedings. Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 11/19/07. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 7 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT (Verified First Amended Class Action Complaint For Damages and Equitable Relief) against all defendants. Filed byChelsea, LLC. (Audet, William) (Filed on 11/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007 Clerk's Notice of Impending ReassignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 5 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate JuCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    First Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Chelsea, LLC (Declination to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge). (Audet, William) (Filed on 11/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 4 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: 11/16/2007 ADR Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 2/22/2008. Case Management Conference set for 2/29/2008 01:30 PM. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: 11/16/2007 Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF RE: Consent to Proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Form due by 11/30/7. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 2 Filed: 11/15/2007, Entered: 11/15/2007 ADR Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 2/15/2008. Case Management Conference set for 2/22/2008 01:30 PM. (Attachments: # (1) CMC Standing Order# (2) JCS Standing Order# (3) New Standing Order)(gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/15/2007, Entered: 11/15/2007 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT for Damages and Equitable Relief; Jury Trial Demanded against Regal Stone, Ltd., Hanjin Shipping, Co., Ltd., China Ocean Shipping Company (Filing fee $ 350.00, receipt number 34611012543). Filed by Chelsea, LLC. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/16/2007 (gba, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 11/15/2007, Entered: 11/15/2007 Case Referred to ECF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 11/15/2007, Entered: 11/15/2007 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Summons Issued as to Regal Stone, Ltd., Hanjin Shipping, Co., Ltd., China Ocean Shipping Company. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 253 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?