Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.
Page 1 Page 2 Page 3
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
7292 |
Filed: 1/10/2020, Entered: None |
? |
|
|
|
|
 |
|
|
105 |
Filed: 10/24/2005, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service Re: Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Papers filed by Amanda J. Gallagher on behalf of AQR Global Asset Allocation Master Account L.P., AQR Absolute Return Master Account L.P.. (Ho, Amanda) (Entered: 10/27/2005)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
92 |
Filed: 10/26/2005, Entered: None |
|
|
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by Leoncio E. De La Pena on behalf of Bancafe International Bank Ltd.. (Attachments: 1 Proposed Order) (De La Pena, Leoncio) (Entered: 10/26/2005)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
91 |
Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Agenda for the November 21, 2013 Hearing filed by Mark J. Politan on behalf of Soundview Elite Ltd.. (Politan, Mark) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
90 |
Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service (related document(s)80) filed by Jeffrey R. Gleit on behalf of Pasig Ltd.. (Gleit, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
89 |
Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service (Notice of Service re: Wilmington Trust N.A.'s Responses and Objections to Subpoena Duces Tecum) filed by Michael J. Merchant on behalf of Wilmington Trust, National Association. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Merchant, Michael) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
88 |
Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service (related document(s)82) filed by Richard C. Morrissey on behalf of United States Trustee. (Morrissey, Richard) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
87 |
Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service (related document(s)84) filed by Mark J. Politan on behalf of Soundview Elite Ltd.. (Politan, Mark) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
86 |
Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service (related document(s)83) filed by Mark J. Politan on behalf of Soundview Elite Ltd.. (Politan, Mark) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
85 |
Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service (related document(s)75) filed by Mark J. Politan on behalf of Soundview Elite Ltd.. (Politan, Mark) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
84 |
Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Response of Debtors' to the Objections of the Joint Official Liquidators and Pasig to the Retention of Stuarts Walker Hersant as Special Counsel (related document(s)77, 47, 80) filed by Mark J. Politan on behalf of Soundview Elite Ltd.. (Politan, Mark) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
83 |
Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Response of Debtors' to the Objection of Pasig to the Stipulation and Consent Order by and between the Debtors and Wilmington Trust Authorizing Release of Funds and for related relief (related document(s)59, 70) filed by Mark J. Politan on behalf of Soundview Elite Ltd.. (Politan, Mark) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
82 |
Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Appoint Trustee /United States Trustee's Motion Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 1104 for Order Directing the Appointment of a Chapter 11 Trustee filed by Richard C. Morrissey on behalf of United States Trustee. with hearing to be held on 12/17/2013 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) (Attachments: # 1 Declaration # 2 Memorandum of Law) (Morrissey, Richard) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
81 |
Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Danielle Braun (related document(s)77, 55, 56) filed by Gary S. Lee on behalf of Peter Anderson and Matthew Wright, as Joint Official Liquidators of Soundview Elite Limited, Soundview Premium and Soundview Star Limited. (Lee, Gary) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
80 |
Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Motion / Objection of Pasig Ltd. to Motion of Debtors for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Stuarts Walker Hersant as Special Counsel to the Debtors, Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date (related document(s)47) filed by Andrew K. Glenn on behalf of Pasig Ltd.. with hearing to be held on 11/21/2013 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) (Glenn, Andrew) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
79 |
Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Corrected Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of CohnReznick LLP as Financial Adviser to the Debtors Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date signed on 11/15/2013. (related document(s)31) (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
78 |
Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Corrected Order signed on 11/14/2013 Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Porzio, Bromberg & Newman, P.C. as Counsel to the Debtors Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date. (related document(s)29) (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
77 |
Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Motion / Joint Official Liquidators' Limited Objection to the Motion of Debtors for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Stuarts Walker Hersant as Special Counsel to the Debtors, Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date (related document(s)47) filed by Gary S. Lee on behalf of Peter Anderson and Matthew Wright, as Joint Official Liquidators of Soundview Elite Limited, Soundview Premium and Soundview Star Limited. (Lee, Gary) (Entered: 11/14/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
76 |
Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service (related document(s)70) filed by Jeffrey R. Gleit on behalf of Pasig Ltd.. (Gleit, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/14/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
75 |
Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing Stipulation and Consent Order By and Between the Debtors and Wilmington Trust, National Association Authorizing the Release of Funds and for Related Relief (related document(s)59, 70) filed by Mark J. Politan on behalf of Soundview Elite Ltd.. with hearing to be held on 11/21/2013 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) Objections due by 11/13/2013, (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation and Consent Order)(Politan, Mark) (Entered: 11/14/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
74 |
Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
***Docketing Error, See Doc No. 79 for Order*** Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of CohnReznick LLP as Financial Advisor to the Debtors Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date (Related Doc 31) signed on 11/14/2013. (Blum, Helene) Modified on 11/15/2013 (White, Greg). (Entered: 11/14/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
73 |
Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
***Docketing Error, See Doc No. 78 for Order*** Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Porzio, Bromberg & Newman, P.C. as Counsel to the Debtors Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date (Related Doc 29) signed on 11/14/2013. (Blum, Helene) Modified on 11/15/2013 (White, Greg). (Entered: 11/14/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
72 |
Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler LLP as Special Counsel to the Debtors, Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date (Related Doc # 41) signed on 11/14/2013. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 11/14/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
71 |
Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit Supplemental Disclosure Affidavit of Warren J. Martin Jr., Esq. Respecting Continued Retention and Employment of Porzio, Bromberg & Newman, P.C. as Counsel to the Debtors (related document(s)29) filed by Mark J. Politan on behalf of Soundview Elite Ltd.. (Politan, Mark) (Entered: 11/13/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
70 |
Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection OF PASIG LTD. TO THE STIPULATION AND CONSENT ORDER BY AND BETWEEN THE DEBTORS AND WILMINGTON TRUST, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AUTHORIZING THE RELEASE OF FUNDS AND FOR RELATED RELIEF (related document(s)59) filed by Andrew K. Glenn on behalf of Pasig Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Glenn, Andrew) (Entered: 11/13/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
69 |
Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service (related document(s)59) filed by Mark J. Politan on behalf of Soundview Elite Ltd.. (Politan, Mark) (Entered: 11/13/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
68 |
Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on November 6, 2013 at 10:04 AM RE: Application for FRBP 2004 Examination Motion for an Order (I) Compelling Turnover and (II) Authorizing the Issuance of a Subpoena and Directing Schulte Roth & Zabel LLP to Produce Documents and Witnesses; Motion of Debtors for a Order Authorizing the Assumption of Administration Agreements, as Modified, Between the Debtors an Pinnacle Fund Adminstration LLC; Authorizing the Retention and Employement of Porzio, Bromberg & Newman, P.C. as Counsel to the Debtors Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date, etc... Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 2/5/2014. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: eScribers, LLC.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.) (RE: related document(s) 43, 31, 41, 29). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 11/14/2013. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 12/2/2013. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 12/9/2013. Transcript access will be restricted through 2/5/2014. (Braithwaite, Kenishia) (Entered: 11/08/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
67 |
Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice RE: Terri Jane Freedman (Related Doc # 65) signed on 11/8/2013. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 11/08/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
66 |
Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service (related document(s)54) filed by Jeffrey R. Gleit on behalf of Pasig Ltd.. (Gleit, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/07/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
65 |
Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Terri Jane Freedman filed by Mark J. Politan on behalf of Soundview Elite Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Politan, Mark) (Entered: 11/07/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
64 |
Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service (related document(s)59) filed by Mark J. Politan on behalf of Soundview Elite Ltd.. (Politan, Mark) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
63 |
Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service (related document(s)53) filed by Mark J. Politan on behalf of Soundview Elite Ltd.. (Politan, Mark) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
62 |
Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service (related document(s)47, 46, 48) filed by Mark J. Politan on behalf of Soundview Elite Ltd.. (Politan, Mark) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
61 |
Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service (related document(s)43, 44) filed by Mark J. Politan on behalf of Soundview Elite Ltd.. (Politan, Mark) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
60 |
Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service (related document(s)42, 41) filed by Mark J. Politan on behalf of Soundview Elite Ltd.. (Politan, Mark) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
59 |
Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Presentment Stipulation and Consent Order By and Between the Debtors and Wilmington Trust, National Association Authorizing the Release of Funds and for Related Relief filed by Mark J. Politan on behalf of Soundview Elite Ltd.. with presentment to be held on 11/13/2013 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 523 (REG) Objections due by 11/13/2013, (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation and Consent Order)(Politan, Mark) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
58 |
Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Agenda for the November 6, 2013 Hearing (related document(s)49, 43, 54, 31, 50, 53, 46, 41, 29) filed by Mark J. Politan on behalf of Soundview Elite Ltd.. with hearing to be held on 11/6/2013 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) (Politan, Mark) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
57 |
Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice re: George Larry Engel (Related Doc # 56) signed on 11/5/2013. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
56 |
Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of George Larry Engel filed by Gary S. Lee on behalf of Peter Anderson and Matthew Wright, as Joint Official Liquidators of Soundview Elite Limited, Soundview Premium and Soundview Star Limited. (Lee, Gary) (Entered: 11/04/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
55 |
Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of All Pleadings and Documents filed by Gary S. Lee on behalf of Peter Anderson and Matthew Wright, as Joint Official Liquidators of Soundview Elite Limited, Soundview Premium and Soundview Star Limited. (Lee, Gary) (Entered: 11/04/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
54 |
Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Motion / Objection of Pasig Ltd. to Motion of Debtors Pursuant to Section 365 of the Bankruptcy Code, Bankruptcy Rule 6006 and Local Bankruptcy Rule 6006-1(a) for an Order Authorizing the Assumption of Administration Agreements, as Modified, Between the Debtors and Pinnacle Fund Administration LLC (related document(s)43) filed by Andrew K. Glenn on behalf of Pasig Ltd.. (Glenn, Andrew) (Entered: 11/04/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
53 |
Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Reply to Motion Debtors Reply to Objections of Pasig Ltd. and the Joint Official Liquidators to (I) The Retention and Employment of Porzio, Bromberg & Newman, P.C. as Counsel to the Debtors Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date, (II) Application of Debtors for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of CohnReznick LLP as Financial Advisor to the Debtors Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date, and (III) Application of Debtors for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler LLP as Special Counsel to the Debtors, Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date (related document(s)31, 41, 29) filed by Mark J. Politan on behalf of Soundview Elite Ltd.. (Politan, Mark) (Entered: 11/04/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
52 |
Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (related document(s)50) filed by Gary S. Lee on behalf of Peter Anderson and Matthew Wright, as Joint Official Liquidators of Soundview Elite Limited, Soundview Premium and Soundview Star Limited. (Lee, Gary) (Entered: 11/04/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
51 |
Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service (related document(s)49) filed by Jeffrey R. Gleit on behalf of Pasig Ltd.. (Gleit, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
50 |
Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Motion / Joint Official Liquidators' Limited Objection to the Applications of Debtors for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of (1) Porzio, Bromberg & Newman, P.C. as Counsel to the Debtors Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date, and (2) Cohnreznick LLP as Financial Advisor to the Debtors Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date, and (3) Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler LLP as Special Counsel to the Debtors, Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date (related document(s)31, 41, 29) filed by Gary S. Lee on behalf of Peter Anderson and Matthew Wright, as Joint Official Liquidators of Soundview Elite Limited, Soundview Premium and Soundview Star Limited. (Lee, Gary) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
49 |
Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Motion / Objection of Pasig LTD. to (I) Application of Debtors for Entry of an Order Pursuant to Section 327(a) of the Bankruptcy Code, Bankruptcy Rules 2014 and 2016, and Local Rules 2014-1 and 2016-1 Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Porzio, Bromberg & Newman, P.C. as counsel to the Debtors Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date, (II) Application of Debtors for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Cohnreznick LLP as Financial Advisor to the Debtors Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date, and (III) Application of Debtors for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler LLP as Special Counsel to the Debtors, Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date (related document(s)31, 41, 29) filed by Andrew K. Glenn on behalf of Pasig Ltd.. with hearing to be held on 11/6/2013 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) (Glenn, Andrew) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
48 |
Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing Motion of Debtors for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Stuarts Walker Hersant as Special Counsel to the Debtors, Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date (related document(s)47) filed by Mark J. Politan on behalf of Soundview Elite Ltd.. with hearing to be held on 11/21/2013 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) Objections due by 11/14/2013, (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Politan, Mark) (Entered: 10/28/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
47 |
Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Approve Motion of Debtors for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Stuarts Walker Hersant as Special Counsel to the Debtors, Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date filed by Mark J. Politan on behalf of Soundview Elite Ltd.. with hearing to be held on 11/21/2013 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) Responses due by 11/14/2013, (Attachments: # 1 Ex A - Declaration in Support # 2 Ex B - Proposed Order) (Politan, Mark) (Entered: 10/28/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
46 |
Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Motion to Shorten Time re: Motion of Debtors Pursuant to Section 365 of the Bankruptcy Code, Bankruptcy Rule 6006 and Local Bankruptcy Rule 6006-1(a) for an Order Authorizing the Assumption of Administration Agreements, as Modified, Between the Debtors and Pinnacle Fund Administration LLC (Related Doc # 44) signed on 10/28/2013. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 10/28/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
45 |
Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on October 16, 2013 at 10:03 AM RE: Motion for Sanctions for Violation of Automatic Stay Motion for an Order Imposing Sanctions Against Citco Global Custody (N.A.) N.V., Deborah Hicks Midanek, The Solon Group, Inc., Optima Absolute Return Fund, Ltd., Richcourt Allweather Fund, Inc., America Alternative Investments, Ltd. for Contempt of the Automatic Stay in Connection with their Continued Prosecution of Foreign Liquidatin Proceedings Following Entry and Clear Notice of Automatic Stay Herein; Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information; Motion to Approve Motion for an Order Establishing Procedures for Monthly Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Professionals and Authorizing and Directing Wilmington Trusts Disbursement of Funds in Accordance with Same; Objection to Motion for Joint Administration. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 1/22/2014. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: eScribers, LLC.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.) (RE: related document(s) 12, 9, 17, 28). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 10/31/2013. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 11/14/2013. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 11/25/2013. Transcript access will be restricted through 1/22/2014. (Braithwaite, Kenishia) (Entered: 10/24/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
44 |
Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Shorten Time Motion of Debtors Pursuant to Section 365 of the Bankruptcy Code, Bankruptcy Rule 6006 and Local Bankruptcy Rule 6006-1(a) for an Order Authorizing the Assumption of Administration Agreements, as Modified, Between the Debtors and Pinnacle Fund Administration LLC (related document(s)43) filed by Mark J. Politan on behalf of Soundview Elite Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Politan, Mark) (Entered: 10/23/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
43 |
Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Assume Motion of Debtors Pursuant to Section 365 of the Bankruptcy Code, Bankruptcy Rule 6006 and Local Bankruptcy Rule 6006-1(a) for an Order Authorizing the Assumption of Administration Agreements, as Modified, Between the Debtors and Pinnacle Fund Administration LLC filed by Mark J. Politan on behalf of Soundview Elite Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A - Katz Affidavit # 2 Ex. B - Part 1 of 3 # 3 Ex. B. - Part 2 of 3 # 4 Ex B. - Part 3 of 3 # 5 Ex. C - Invoices # 6 Ex. D - Contract Amendment # 7 Proposed Order) (Politan, Mark) (Entered: 10/23/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
42 |
Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing Application of Debtors for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler LLP as Special Counsel to the Debtors, Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date (related document(s)41) filed by Mark J. Politan on behalf of Soundview Elite Ltd.. with hearing to be held on 11/6/2013 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) Objections due by 10/30/2013, (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Politan, Mark) (Entered: 10/16/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
41 |
Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Approve Application of Debtors for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler LLP as Special Counsel to the Debtors, Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date filed by Mark J. Politan on behalf of Soundview Elite Ltd.. with hearing to be held on 11/6/2013 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) Responses due by 10/30/2013, (Attachments: # 1 Ex A - Harvey Declaration # 2 Ex B - Proposed Order) (Politan, Mark) (Entered: 10/16/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
40 |
Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Motion for Procedural Consolidation and Joint Administration (Related Doc # 7) signed on 10/16/2013. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 10/16/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
39 |
Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service (related document(s)18, 17) filed by Kelly D. Curtin on behalf of Soundview Elite Ltd.. (Curtin, Kelly) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
38 |
Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service (related document(s)13, 12) filed by Kelly D. Curtin on behalf of Soundview Elite Ltd.. (Curtin, Kelly) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
37 |
Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service (related document(s)30, 29) filed by Kelly D. Curtin on behalf of Soundview Elite Ltd.. (Curtin, Kelly) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
36 |
Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service (related document(s)10, 9) filed by Kelly D. Curtin on behalf of Soundview Elite Ltd.. (Curtin, Kelly) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
35 |
Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service (related document(s)32, 31) filed by Kelly D. Curtin on behalf of Soundview Elite Ltd.. (Curtin, Kelly) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
34 |
Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service (related document(s)16) filed by Kelly D. Curtin on behalf of Soundview Elite Ltd.. (Curtin, Kelly) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
33 |
Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Agenda for October 16, 2013 Hearing at 9:45 a.m. (ET) (related document(s)7, 12, 9, 17) filed by Mark J. Politan on behalf of Soundview Elite Ltd.. (Politan, Mark) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
32 |
Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing Application of Debtors for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of CohnReznick LLP as Financial Advisor to the Debtors Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date (related document(s)31) filed by Mark J. Politan on behalf of Soundview Elite Ltd.. with hearing to be held on 11/6/2013 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) Objections due by 10/30/2013, (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Politan, Mark) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
31 |
Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Approve Application of Debtors for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of CohnReznick LLP as Financial Advisor to the Debtors Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date filed by Mark J. Politan on behalf of Soundview Elite Ltd.. with hearing to be held on 11/6/2013 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) Responses due by 10/30/2013, (Attachments: # 1 Ex A Katz Affidavit # 2 Ex B Proposed Order) (Politan, Mark) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
30 |
Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing Application of Debtors for Entry of an Order Pursuant to Section 327(a) of the Bankruptcy Code, Bankruptcy Rules 2014 and 2016, and Local Rules 2014-1 And 2016-1 Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Porzio, Bromberg & Newman, P.C. as Counsel to the Debtors Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date (related document(s)29) filed by Mark J. Politan on behalf of Soundview Elite Ltd.. with hearing to be held on 11/6/2013 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) Objections due by 10/30/2013, (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Politan, Mark) (Entered: 10/09/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
29 |
Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Approve Application of Debtors for Entry of an Order Pursuant to Section 327(a) of the Bankruptcy Code, Bankruptcy Rules 2014 and 2016, and Local Rules 2014-1 And 2016-1 Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Porzio, Bromberg & Newman, P.C. as Counsel to the Debtors Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date filed by Mark J. Politan on behalf of Soundview Elite Ltd.. with hearing to be held on 11/6/2013 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) Responses due by 10/30/2013, (Attachments: # 1 Ex A - Martin Declaration # 2 Ex B - Fletcher Declaration # 3 Ex C - Engagement Letter # 4 Ex D Proposed Order) (Politan, Mark) (Entered: 10/09/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
28 |
Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Response to Motion for an Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105(a) and 331 Establishing Procedures for Monthly Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Professionals and Authorizing and Directing Wilmington Trust's Disbursement of Funds in Accordance With Same (related document(s)9) filed by Michael J. Merchant on behalf of Wilmington Trust, National Association. with hearing to be held on 10/16/2013 (check with court for location) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Certificate of Service) (Merchant, Michael) (Entered: 10/09/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
27 |
Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Danielle Braun (related document(s)22) filed by Gary S. Lee on behalf of Peter Anderson and Matthew Wright, as Joint Official Liquidators of Soundview Elite Limited, Soundview Premium and Soundview Star Limited. (Lee, Gary) (Entered: 10/09/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
26 |
Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
So Ordered Stipulation signed on 10/9/2013 Between All Parties Establishing Briefing Schedule and Hearing Dates in Accordance with the Endorsed Order Dated October 7, 2013. With Evidentiary Hearing to be held on 12/17/2013 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 10/09/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
25 |
Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice re: Michael J. Merchant (Related Doc # 24) signed on 10/9/2013. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 10/09/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
24 |
Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Michael J. Merchant filed by Katherine Good on behalf of Wilmington Trust, National Association. (Good, Katherine) (Entered: 10/08/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
23 |
Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Endorsed Order signed on 10/7/2013 "The attached email violates the letter, and submissions by other parties violate the spirit, of this Courts Endorsed Order, dated 10/1/13 (ECF #16), requiring service on counsel for the Fletcher International Trustee of all papers in this case. For the avoidance of doubt, all communications to the Courtof any nature, and by all partiesare to be served or copied on counsel for the Fletcher International Trustee". etc. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 10/07/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
22 |
Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection /Supplement to the Joint Official Liquidators Objection to the Motion For Joint Administration (related document(s)14) filed by Gary S. Lee on behalf of Peter Anderson and Matthew Wright, as Joint Official Liquidators of Soundview Elite Limited, Soundview Premium and Soundview Star Limited. (Lee, Gary) (Entered: 10/07/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
21 |
Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Papers filed by Andrew K. Glenn on behalf of Pasig Ltd.. (Glenn, Andrew) (Entered: 10/04/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
20 |
Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Laura Guido (related document(s)14) filed by Gary S. Lee on behalf of Peter Anderson and Matthew Wright, as Joint Official Liquidators of Soundview Elite Limited, Soundview Premium and Soundview Star Limited. (Lee, Gary) (Entered: 10/04/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
19 |
Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Case Management Order #1 signed on 10/4/2013. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 10/04/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
18 |
Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order Extending Time to File Schedules and Statements of Financial Affairs (related document(s)17) filed by Mark J. Politan on behalf of Soundview Elite Ltd.. with hearing to be held on 10/16/2013 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) Objections due by 10/9/2013, (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Politan, Mark) (Entered: 10/02/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
17 |
Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information filed by Mark J. Politan on behalf of Soundview Elite Ltd.. with hearing to be held on 10/16/2013 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) Objections due by 10/9/2013, (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Politan, Mark) (Entered: 10/02/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
16 |
Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Endorsed Order signed on 10/1/2013 Scheduling Argument on Objection for Joint Administration for October 16, 2013 at 9:45 AM. (related document(s)14) (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
15 |
Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service (related document(s)7, 8) filed by Kelly D. Curtin on behalf of Soundview Elite Ltd.. (Curtin, Kelly) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
14 |
Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Motion / Joint Official Liquidators' Objection to Motion for Joint Administration (related document(s)7) filed by Gary S. Lee on behalf of Peter Anderson and Matthew Wright, as Joint Official Liquidators of Soundview Elite Limited, Soundview Premium and Soundview Star Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Francis Declaration) (Lee, Gary) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
13 |
Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing Motion for an Order Imposing Sanctions Against Citco Global Custody (N.A.) N.V., Deborah Hicks Midanek, The Solon Group, Inc., Optima Absolute Return Fund, Ltd., Richcourt Allweather Fund, Inc., America Alternative Investments, Ltd. for Contempt of the Automatic Stay in Connection with their Continued Prosecution of Foreign Liquidation Proceedings Following Entry and Clear Notice of the Automatic Stay Herein (related document(s)12) filed by Mark J. Politan on behalf of Soundview Elite Ltd.. with hearing to be held on 10/16/2013 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) Objections due by 10/9/2013, (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Politan, Mark) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
12 |
Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion for Sanctions for Violation of Automatic Stay Motion for an Order Imposing Sanctions Against Citco Global Custody (N.A.) N.V., Deborah Hicks Midanek, The Solon Group, Inc., Optima Absolute Return Fund, Ltd., Richcourt Allweather Fund, Inc., America Alternative Investments, Ltd. for Contempt of the Automatic Stay in Connection with their Continued Prosecution of Foreign Liquidation Proceedings Following Entry and Clear Notice of the Automatic Stay Herein filed by Mark J. Politan on behalf of Soundview Elite Ltd.. with hearing to be held on 10/16/2013 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) Responses due by 10/9/2013, (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Richard Thomas William Annette # 2 Declaration of Warren J. Martin, Jr. # 3 Proposed Order) (Politan, Mark) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
11 |
Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors (related document(s) (Related Doc # 6)) . Notice Date 09/27/2013. (Admin.) (Entered: 09/28/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
10 |
Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing Regarding Motion for an Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105(a) and 331 Establishing Procedures for Monthly Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Professionals and Authorizing and Directing Wilmington Trust's Disbursement of Funds in Accordance With Same (related document(s)9) filed by Kelly D. Curtin on behalf of Soundview Elite Ltd.. with hearing to be held on 10/16/2013 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) Objections due by 10/9/2013, (Curtin, Kelly) (Entered: 09/27/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
9 |
Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Approve Motion for an Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105(a) and 331 Establishing Procedures for Monthly Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Professionals and Authorizing and Directing Wilmington Trust's Disbursement of Funds in Accordance With Same filed by Kelly D. Curtin on behalf of Soundview Elite Ltd.. with hearing to be held on 10/16/2013 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 523 (REG) Responses due by 10/9/2013, (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Curtin, Kelly) (Entered: 09/27/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
8 |
Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Presentment of Order Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 1015(B) Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases filed by Kelly D. Curtin on behalf of Soundview Elite Ltd.. with presentment to be held on 10/1/2013 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 523 (REG) (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Curtin, Kelly) (Entered: 09/25/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
7 |
Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion for Joint Administration filed by Kelly D. Curtin on behalf of Soundview Elite Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Curtin, Kelly) (Entered: 09/25/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6 |
Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/25/2013 at 02:30 PM at 80 Broad St., 4th Floor, USTM. (Philbert, Gemma). (Entered: 09/25/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
5 |
Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice re: Warren J. Martin Jr. (Related Doc # 3) signed on 9/25/2013. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 09/25/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
4 |
Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Corporate Ownership Statement . filed by Kelly D. Curtin on behalf of Soundview Elite Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Corporate Resolution)(Curtin, Kelly) (Entered: 09/24/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
3 |
Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Warren J. Martin Jr. filed by Michael J. Naporano on behalf of Soundview Elite Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Naporano, Michael) (Entered: 09/24/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2 |
Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit Declaration of Alphonse Fletcher, Jr. Pursuant to Local Rule 1007-2 filed by Mark J. Politan on behalf of Soundview Elite Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A to J)(Politan, Mark) (Entered: 09/24/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1 |
Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: None |
|
|
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11). Order for Relief Entered. Schedule A due 10/8/2013. Schedule B due 10/8/2013. Schedule D due 10/8/2013. Schedule E due 10/8/2013. Schedule F due 10/8/2013. Schedule G due 10/8/2013. Schedule H due 10/8/2013. Summary of schedules - Page 1 due 10/8/2013. Statement of Financial Affairs due 10/8/2013. Atty Disclosure State. due 10/8/2013. Employee Income Record Due: 10/8/2013. Incomplete Filings due by 10/8/2013, Chapter 11 Plan due by 1/22/2014, Disclosure Statement due by 1/22/2014, Initial Case Conference due by 10/24/2013, Filed by Mark J. Politan of Porzio, Bromberg & Newman, PC on behalf of Soundview Elite Ltd.. (Politan, Mark) (Entered: 09/24/2013)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
18734 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Lauren Rodriguez of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 18638 , 18640 , 18622 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18733 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Lauren Rodriguez of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 18581 , 18083 , 18582 , 18587 , 18084 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18732 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Lauren Rodriguez of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 18572 , 18391 , 18566 , 18390 , 18546 , 18547 , 18543 , 18571 , 18540 , 18545 , 18568 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18731 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Panagiota Manatakis of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 18630 , 18629 , 18631 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC Claims Agent.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18730 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Panagiota Manatakis of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 18668 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC Claims Agent.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18729 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:CNP Assurances(Claim No.63595, Amount 109,230,286.86). To Goldman, Sachs & Co.. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Goldman, Sachs & Co..(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
18728 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:CNP Assurances(Claim No.63595, Amount 115,983,787.90). To Goldman, Sachs & Co.. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Goldman, Sachs & Co..(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18727 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice to Transferor Withdrawal Of Notice Of Transfer Re: Claim 57175 filed by Christopher R. Donoho III on behalf of Standard Chartered Bank (Hong Kong) Limited.(Donoho, Christopher) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18726 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice to Transferor Withdrawal Of Notice Of Transfer Re: Claim 39962 filed by Christopher R. Donoho III on behalf of Standard Chartered Bank (Hong Kong) Limited.(Donoho, Christopher) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18725 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice to Transferor Withdrawal Of Notice Of Transfer Re: Claims 38860 And 38861 filed by Christopher R. Donoho III on behalf of Standard Chartered Bank (Hong Kong) Limited.(Donoho, Christopher) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18724 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Commerzbank AG(Claim No.58574, Amount 4,957,564.50); Commerzbank AG(Claim No.58575, Amount 2,609,617.50). To J.P. Morgan Securities, Ltd.. filed by Howard J. Grossman on behalf of J.P. Morgan Securities, Ltd..(Grossman, Howard) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18723 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appearance And Request For Service Of Papers filed by Adam D. Cole on behalf of Florida Power & Light Company, and NextEra Energy Power Marketing, LLC. (Cole, Adam) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18722 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order signed on 7/22/2011 Granting Debtors' Motion Pursuant to Section 363 of the Bankruptcy Code and Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019 for Authority to (I) Enter into the Third Amended Joint Chapter 11 Plan Proposed by the Lehman Creditors and the Suncal Trustee on Behalf of the Suncal Involuntary Debtors in Eight of the Suncal Involuntary Debtors Cases; (II) Enter into the Third Amended Joint Chapter 11 Plan Proposed by the Lehman Lenders in Eleven of the Suncal Voluntary Debtors Cases; and (iii) Participate in any Auction of the Suncal Debtors Assets. (related document(s) 18685 , 18641 , 18122 ) (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18721 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by Drew D. Hansen on behalf of Mason Capital Management LLC. Filing fee collected, receipt #187247. (Porter, Minnie) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18720 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Manners of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 18606 , 18591 , 18611 , 18599 , 18600 , 18609 , 18601 , 18607 , 18597 , 18592 , 18595 , 18594 , 18608 , 18605 , 18610 , 18604 , 18596 , 18593 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC Claims Agent.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18719 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Panagiota Manatakis of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 18637 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC Claims Agent.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18718 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Panagiota Manatakis of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 18632 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC Claims Agent.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18717 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Kossivas of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 18661 , 18660 , 18663 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC Claims Agent.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18716 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Yorvik Partners LLP(Claim No.18216, Amount 1,873,584.58). To Jatralec Capital LLC. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of JATRALEC CAPITAL LLC.(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18715 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appearance filed by Brent C. Strickland on behalf of Monarch Alternative Capital LP. (Strickland, Brent) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18126 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Approve / Amended Motion (i) for Approval of the Disclosure Statement and the Form and Manner of Notice of the Disclosure Statement Hearing, (ii) Establishing Solicitation and Voting Procedures, (iii) Scheduling a Confirmation Hearing, and (iv) Establishing Notice and Objection Procedures for Confirmation of the Debtors' Joint Chapter 11 Plan filed by Alfredo R. Perez on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Perez, Alfredo) (Entered: 06/29/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18125 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Disclosure Statement / Debtors' Disclosure Statement for Second Amended Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. and its Affiliated Debtors Pursuant to Section 1125 of the Bankruptcy Code filed by Lori R. Fife on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Fife, Lori) (Entered: 06/29/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18124 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Chapter 11 Plan / Second Amended Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. and its Affiliated Debtors filed by Lori R. Fife on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Fife, Lori) (Entered: 06/29/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18123 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Declaration of Alfredo R. Prez in Connection with Debtors' Motion Pursuant to Section 363 of the Bankruptcy Code and Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019 for Authority to (i) Enter into the Second Amended Joint Chapter 11 Plan Proposed by the Lehman Creditors and the Suncal Trustee on Behalf of the Suncal Involuntary Debtors in Eight of the Suncal Involuntary Debtors Cases; (ii) Enter into the Second Amended Joint Chapter 11 Plan Proposed by the Lehman Lenders in Eleven of the Suncal Voluntary Debtors Cases; and (iii) Participate in any Auction of the Suncal Debtors Assets (related document(s) 18122 ) filed by Alfredo R. Perez on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Perez, Alfredo) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18122 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Authorize : Debtors' Motion Pursuant to Section 363 of the Bankruptcy Code and Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019 for Authority to (i) Enter into the Second Amended Joint Chapter 11 Plan Proposed by the Lehman Creditors and the Suncal Trustee on Behalf of the Suncal Involuntary Debtors in Eight of the Suncal Involuntary Debtors Cases; (ii) Enter into the Second Amended Joint Chapter 11 Plan Proposed by the Lehman Lenders in Eleven of the Suncal Voluntary Debtors Cases; and (iii) Participate in any Auction of the Suncal Debtors Assets filed by Alfredo R. Perez on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 7/20/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Responses due by 7/13/2011, (Perez, Alfredo) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18121 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Timothy Pillar in Connection with the Various Debtor Objections to Residential Real Estate Mortgage Loan Proofs of Claim Filed by U.S. Bank National Association or its Predecessor Bank of America National Association for Insufficient Documentation filed by Ann E. Acker on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit F# 6 Exhibit G# 7 Exhibit H)(Acker, Ann) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18120 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Lau Yun Ping(Claim No.39411, Amount 64,232); Leung Hang Shim, Chan Yin Ling(Claim No.38752, Amount 128,464); Woo Yu Sum(Claim No.48154, Amount 64,232); Wu Cho Woon(Claim No.48001, Amount 109,194); Law Siu Luen(Claim No.39124, Amount 64,232); Wong Siu Keung, Wong Hoi Yan(Claim No.38589, Amount 77,078); Lai Pik Lin(Claim No.38351, Amount 64,232); Siu Chi Fung(Claim No.38024, Amount 64,232); Chen Jen Jen(Claim No.38238, Amount 308,313); Chan Yun Kan(Claim No.39420, Amount 64,232). To Standard Chartered Bank (Hong Kong) Ltd.. filed by Christopher R. Donoho III on behalf of Standard Chartered Bank (Hong Kong) Limited.(Donoho, Christopher) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18119 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Ng Wing Ning Victor(Claim No.39395, Amount 64,232); Ng Kit Wa, Chan Chan Ping(Claim No.38009, Amount 64,232); Mok Chiu Shirine Yee Man(Claim No.38789, Amount 64,232); Chan Sui Lan(Claim No.38791, Amount 64,232); Yang Shu-Hwa(Claim No.48412, Amount 330,000); Kwan Dah Fu Michael(Claim No.39671, Amount 130,000); Jar Wan Yu(Claim No.38032, Amount 65,000); Wong Man Sing(Claim No.48179, Amount 64,232); Lui Siu Wah(Claim No.39078, Amount 64,232); Cheung Foo Kiu(Claim No.38696, Amount 64,232). To Standard Chartered Bank (Hong Kong) Ltd.. filed by Christopher R. Donoho III on behalf of Standard Chartered Bank (Hong Kong) Limited.(Donoho, Christopher) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18118 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Authorize : Debtors' Motion Pursuant to Sections 105(a) and 363 of the Bankruptcy Code for Authorization to (i) Expand the Scope of Legal Costs that they may Advance to Former Employees and (ii) to Advance Legal Costs to Current Directors filed by Richard P. Krasnow on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 7/20/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Responses due by 7/13/2011, (Krasnow, Richard) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18117 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Ho Kwok Kit(Claim No.38697, Amount 64,232); Liu Chung Fan(Claim No.48127, Amount 128,464); Chou Priscilla Wai Yi(Claim No.39868, Amount 65,000); Chan Pong Hing(Claim No.38895, Amount 64,232); Yu Lee Shuk Mun Linna(Claim No.38692, Amount 65,000); Kim Shin Yang(Claim No.48254, Amount 128,464); Lin Guanqun(Claim No.39233, Amount 1,000,000); Chen Suk Lan Germio(Claim No.48186, Amount 64,232); Chan Man Ho(Claim No.48533, Amount 64,232); Ng Lai Sum(Claim No.38591, Amount 64,232). To Standard Chartered Bank (Hong Kong) Ltd.. filed by Christopher R. Donoho III on behalf of Standard Chartered Bank (Hong Kong) Limited.(Donoho, Christopher) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18116 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Declaration of Robert Hershan in Support of Motion Pursuant to Sections 105(a) and 365 of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rules 6006, 9014 and 9019 for Authorization to (i) Terminate and Settle or (ii) Reject Certain Prepetition Derivatives Contracts with Trusts for which U.S. Bank National Association Serves as Indenture Trustee and Related Relief (related document(s) 18106 ) filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18115 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Wong Kai Man(Claim No.48175, Amount 64,232); Tan Chan Lily Wing Kwan(Claim No.38793, Amount 128,464); Leung Mee Yin Christina(Claim No.39472, Amount 64,232); Leung Woi Yuen(Claim No.38854, Amount 64,232); Lin Yu Ping(Claim No.39216, Amount 128,464); Ng Chun Yin Navid(Claim No.47594, Amount 64,232); Fang Shun(Claim No.39714, Amount 64,232); Yuen Man Lai(Claim No.48535, Amount 64,232); Yu Angela Hui(Claim No.48260, Amount 77,078); Chung Alvin Chong Hwa(Claim No.39184, Amount 179,849). To Standard Chartered Bank (Hong Kong) Ltd.. filed by Christopher R. Donoho III on behalf of Standard Chartered Bank (Hong Kong) Limited.(Donoho, Christopher) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18114 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' Thirty-Fourth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Misclassified Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 7/21/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Objections due by 7/7/2011, (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18113 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement / Second Amended Verified Statement of Arent Fox LLP Pursuant to Rule 2019 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure (related document(s) 12018 ) filed by David L. Dubrow on behalf of Arent Fox LLP. (Dubrow, David) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18112 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Sung Sau Fan(Claim No.37903, Amount 64,232); Kwok Kam Chiu(Claim No.38740, Amount 64,232); Man Ling Heung(Claim No.38688, Amount 64,000); Mak Wing Sum(Claim No.39417, Amount 64,232); Zhang Xiaofei(Claim No.48407, Amount 100,000); Chow Shu Ying(Claim No.48063, Amount 64,232); Ho Siu Wah Michelle(Claim No.38063, Amount 64,232); Ng Kwok Keung(Claim No.47546, Amount 64,232); So Yuk Ching(Claim No.38707, Amount 64,232); Chak Sin Hung(Claim No.37797, Amount 65,000). To Standard Chartered Bank (Hong Kong) Ltd.. filed by Christopher R. Donoho III on behalf of Standard Chartered Bank (Hong Kong) Limited.(Donoho, Christopher) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18111 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Lau Wai Chuen(Claim No.38346, Amount 64,232); Hui Hau Yip(Claim No.39381, Amount 83,501); Lam Oi Chu Karen(Claim No.38640, Amount 64,232); Yiu Sau King(Claim No.37961, Amount 167,003); Chiu Wai Lau Clara(Claim No.47566, Amount 256,927); Chan Hou Kam(Claim No.39349, Amount 65,000); Qian Wu(Claim No.48453, Amount 301,890); Lo Hoi Heung(Claim No.39189, Amount 64,232); Wu Ke Ling(Claim No.48451, Amount 390,000); Wong Kam Ho(Claim No.48131, Amount 64,232). To Standard Chartered Bank (Hong Kong) Ltd.. filed by Christopher R. Donoho III on behalf of Standard Chartered Bank (Hong Kong) Limited.(Donoho, Christopher) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18110 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Lauren Rodriguez of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 17963 , 17829 , 17766 , 17923 , 17660 , 17971 , 17781 , 17834 , 17958 , 17826 , 17662 , 17824 , 17967 , 17966 , 17972 , 17965 , 17926 , 17973 , 17961 , 17927 , 17947 , 17956 , 17924 , 17968 , 17970 , 17955 , 17975 , 17948 , 17656 , 17949 , 17828 , 17954 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18109 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 1 Transferors:Palmyra Capital Fund, L.P.(Claim No.3220, Amount 1,530,905.64); Palmyra Capital Institutional Fund, L.P.(Claim No.3221, Amount 909,391.55); Palmyra Capital Offshore Fund, L.P.(Claim No.3218, Amount 2,604,445.43). To JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA. filed by Howard J. Grossman on behalf of JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A..(Grossman, Howard) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18108 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 18035 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Malo, David) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18107 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Lauren Rodriguez of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 17964 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18106 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Reject / Motion Pursuant to Sections 105(a) and 365 of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rules 6006, 9014, and 9019 for Authorization to Terminate and Settle or Reject Certain Prepetition Derivatives Contracts with Trusts for which U.S. Bank National Association Serves as Indenture Trustee and Related Relief filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 7/20/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Responses due by 7/13/2011, (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18105 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Presentment of Supplemental Order Reinstating Claim (related document(s) 13164 ) filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with presentment to be held on 7/6/2011 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Objections due by 7/5/2011, (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18104 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Letter Regarding Annual General Meeting of the Shareholders of Easdaq N.V. filed by Easdaq. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18103 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' Objection to Certain Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) as to Owl Creek Entities and Lloyds TSB Bank PLC filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 7/21/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18102 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' Objection to Certain Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) as to BGI Fixed Income Global Alpha Fund Ltd. and Gazprombank Mortgage Funding 2 S.A. filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 9/28/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18101 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' One Hundred Thirty-Eighth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Derivatives Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18100 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' One Hundred Twenty-Ninth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Derivatives Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 7/21/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18099 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' One Hundred Eighteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims (To Reclassify Proofs of Claim as Equity Interests) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 8/25/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18098 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
So Ordered Stipulation and Order Signed on 6/28/2011 Between the Debtors and Goldman Sachs Resolving the Debtors' Motion to Compel and Goldman Sachs's Cross-Motion for a Protective Order. (Related Doc # 17231 , 17640 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18097 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Signed on 6/28/2011 Granting Seventh Supplemental Application of the Debtors to Expand the Scope of Jones Day's Retention as Special Counsel, Nunc Pro Tunc to the Engagement Dates. (related document(s) 17570 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18096 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Ore Hill Hub Fund Ltd.(Claim No.15365, Amount 805,000.00). To Wilshire Institutional Master Fund II SPC. filed by Timothy Bennett on behalf of Ore Hill Hub Fund Ltd..(Bennett, Timothy) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18095 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Vicis Capital, LLC, as investment manager(Claim No.34940, Amount 4,822,508.49). To Bank of America, N.A.. filed by Nickolas Karavolas on behalf of Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP.(Karavolas, Nickolas) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18094 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Declaration of Zachary Trumpp in Support of Debtors' Reply to Response of Citibank, N.A. and Wilmington Trust Company to Debtors One Hundred and Ninth Omnibus Objection (Insufficient Documentation) (related document(s) 18092 ) filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18093 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Declaration of Keri Reed in Support of Debtors' Reply to Response of Citibank, N.A. and Wilmington Trust Company to Debtors One Hundred and Ninth Omnibus Objection (Insufficient Documentation) (related document(s) 18092 ) filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18092 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response : Debtors' Reply to Response of Citibank, N.A. and Wilmington Trust Company to Debtors' One Hundred and Ninth Omnibus Objection (Insufficient Documentation) (related document(s) 17883 , 15008 ) filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18091 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Declaration of Zachary Trumpp in Support of Debtors' Reply to U.S. Bank's Response to Debtors' Ninety-Eighth, Ninety-Ninth, and One Hundred and Ninth Omnibus Objections to Claims (Insufficient Documentation) (related document(s) 18088 ) filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18090 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Declaration of Keri Reed in Support of Debtors' Reply to U.S. Bank's Response to Debtors' Ninety-Eighth, Ninety-Ninth, and One Hundred and Ninth Omnibus Objections to Claims (Insufficient Documentation) (related document(s) 18088 ) filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18089 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Knowle Limited(Claim No.10690, Amount 1,092,235.74). To IAB Limited. filed by Jonathan Chi-Shoong Cho on behalf of Knowle Limited.(Chi-Shoong Cho, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18088 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response : Debtors' Reply to U.S. Banks Response to Debtors' Ninety-Eighth, Ninety-Ninth, and One Hundred and Ninth Omnibus Objections to Claims (Insufficient Documentation) (related document(s) 16891 , 14994 , 14993 , 15008 ) filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18087 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:CVI GVF (Lux) Master SARL(Claim No.59098, Amount 14,243,000.00). To Barclays Bank PLC. filed by Jessica Fainman on behalf of Barclays Bank PLC.(Fainman, Jessica) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14384 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Yorvik Partners LLP(Claim No.55940, Amount 4,967,001.00). To Jatralec Capital LLC. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of JATRALEC CAPITAL LLC.(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14383 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Banco Espirito Santo S.A., Sucursal en Espana(Claim No.55940, Amount 4,967,001.00). To Yorvik Partners LLP. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Yorvik Partners LLP.(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14382 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch(Claim No.24540, Amount 9,370,000.00). To Perry Principals, L.L.C.. filed by Thomas T. Janover on behalf of Perry Principals LLC.(Janover, Thomas) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14381 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch(Claim No.24543, Amount 9,370,000.00). To Perry Principals, L.L.C.. filed by Thomas T. Janover on behalf of Perry Principals LLC.(Janover, Thomas) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14380 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 14377 ) filed by Anthony Paduano on behalf of Jason T. Taylor. (Paduano, Anthony) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14379 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Letter of Antin Epargne Pension Notifying of Name Change (related document(s) 14180 , 14258 ) filed by Jeff J. Friedman on behalf of Illiquidx Ltd.. (Friedman, Jeff) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14378 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 1 Transferors:UBS AG(Claim No. 59233). To Nomura International plc. filed by Douglas P. Bartner on behalf of Nomura International plc.(Bartner, Douglas) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14377 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Anthony Paduano on behalf of Jason T. Taylor. (Attachments: # 1 Pleading Motion Of Jason T. Taylor# 2 Exhibit Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit Exhibit D# 6 Exhibit Exhibit E# 7 Exhibit Exhibit F# 8 Exhibit Exhibit G) (Paduano, Anthony) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14376 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appearance filed by Anthony Paduano on behalf of Jason T. Taylor. (Paduano, Anthony) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14375 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Notice of Partial Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.63604, Amount 256,010.70). To Silver Point Capital Fund, L.P.. filed by Arvin Abraham on behalf of Silver Point Capital Fund, L.P. and Silver Point Capital Offshore Fund, Ltd..(Abraham, Arvin) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14374 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Notice of Partial Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.63604, Amount 597,358.30). To Silver Point Capital Offshore Master Fund, L.P.. filed by Arvin Abraham on behalf of Silver Point Capital Fund, L.P. and Silver Point Capital Offshore Fund, Ltd..(Abraham, Arvin) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14373 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Credit Suisse International(Claim No.55398, Amount 5,366,700.00). To CVI GVF (Lux) Master Sarl. filed by Carval Investors UK Limited.(Jacobsen, Annemarie) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14372 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 1 Transferors:Illiquidz Ltd.(Claim No.41223, Amount 9,322,350). To JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA. filed by Howard J. Grossman on behalf of JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A..(Grossman, Howard) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14371 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Illiquidx, Ltd.(Claim No.41223, Amount 9,322,350.00). To JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. filed by Howard J. Grossman on behalf of JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A..(Grossman, Howard) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14370 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Withdrawal of Claim(s): Nos. 24962, 32173 AND 32174 by Puget Sound Energy, Inc. filed by Bruce G. MacIntyre on behalf of Puget Sound Energy, Inc..(MacIntyre, Bruce) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14369 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Acknowledgment of transfer FRBP 3001(e)1 Notice of Transfer of Claim #50355 from Morgan Stanley & Co. International PLC to The Liverpool Limited Partnership filed by Matthew J. Gold on behalf of The Liverpool Limited Partnership.(Gold, Matthew) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14368 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Acknowledgment of transfer FRBP 3001(e)1 Notice of Transfer of Claim #50351 from Morgan Stanley & Co. International PLC to Elliott International LP filed by Matthew J. Gold on behalf of Elliott International L.P..(Gold, Matthew) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14367 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch(Claim No.20234, Amount 5,620,725.00); Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch(Claim No.20232, Amount 5,620,725.00); Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch(Claim No.20233, Amount 32,164,346.00); Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch(Claim No.20235, Amount 30,671,755.00); Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch(Claim No.30067, Amount 30,761,755.00); Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch(Claim No.20236, Amount 21,544,979.00); Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch(Claim No.42923, Amount 21,876,326.46); Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch(Claim No.20237, Amount 21,544,979.00); Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch(Claim No.45922, Amount 21,876,326.46). To CVI GVF (Lux) Master Sarl. filed by Carval Investors UK Limited.(Jacobsen, Annemarie) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14366 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Acknowledgment of transfer FRBP 3001(e)1 Notice of Transfer of Claim #17849 from Banco Espirito Santo de Investimento, S.A. to Elliott Associates LP. filed by Matthew J. Gold on behalf of Elliott Associates, L.P..(Gold, Matthew) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14365 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:UBS AG London Branch(Claim No.16022, Amount 2,952,612.21). To Strategic Value Master Fund, Ltd.. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Strategic Value Master Fund, Ltd..(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14364 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:UBS AG London Branch(Claim No.16022, Amount 755,033.32). To Harvest SS, Ltd.. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Harvest SS, Ltd..(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14363 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Goldman Sachs Lending Partners LLC(Claim No.11021, Amount 17,000,000.00). To CVI GVF (Lux) Master Sarl. filed by Carval Investors UK Limited.(Jacobsen, Annemarie) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14362 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Banca Intermobiliare Di Investimenti e Gestioni(Claim No.20771, Amount 2,504,865.10). To CVI GVF Luxembourg Twelve S.a.r.l.,. filed by Carval Investors UK Limited.(Jacobsen, Annemarie) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7134 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7133 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7132 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7130 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7129 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7128 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7127 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7126 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7125 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing /Notice of Cancellation of Omnibus Hearing Scheduled For August 24, 2011 at 10:00 a.m. filed by Steven Wilamowsky on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Wilamowsky, Steven) (Entered: 08/22/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7124 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Omni Manangement Group, LLC (related document(s) 7123 ) filed by Steven Wilamowsky on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Wilamowsky, Steven) (Entered: 08/22/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7123 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7122 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice to Transferor Wall Street Mortgage, Inc. with Certificate of Mailing Regarding Docket No. 7111 filed by Omni Management Group, LLC.(Osborne, Brian) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7121 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Change of Address for Jointly Administered Case No. 05-50023 (RDD) filed by Jinming Cao. (Ho, Amanda) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7120 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Change of Address for Jointly Administered Case No. 05-50023 (RDD) filed by Shuhong Fan. (Ho, Amanda) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7119 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7118 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7117 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7116 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7115 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7114 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7113 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing /Third Amended Notice of Omnibus Hearing Dates filed by Stephanie W. Mai on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Mai, Stephanie) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7112 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 7110 ) filed by Stephanie W. Mai on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Mai, Stephanie) (Entered: 06/28/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7111 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
7110 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7109 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7108 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7107 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7106 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7105 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7104 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7103 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7102 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7101 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7100 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7099 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7098 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7097 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7096 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7094 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing /Notice Of Cancellation Of Omnibus Hearing Scheduled For February 9, 2011 At 10:00 A.M. filed by Steven Wilamowsky on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Wilamowsky, Steven) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7093 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7092 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7091 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7090 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7089 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7088 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7086 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7085 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Stipulation and Agreed Order signed on 12/15/2010 Approving Settlement Agreement Among The RCM Plan Admnistrator, The Refco Plan Admnistrator and Grant Thornton LLP (Related Doc # 7080 ) . (Correa, Mimi) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7084 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing /Notice of Cancellation of Hearing Scheduled For December 16, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. filed by Steven Wilamowsky on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Wilamowsky, Steven) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7083 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7082 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7081 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7080 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7079 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7078 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7077 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7076 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7075 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7074 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7073 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7072 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7071 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7070 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7069 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7068 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7067 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7066 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7065 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7064 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7063 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7062 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7061 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7060 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7059 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7058 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7057 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7056 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7055 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7054 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7053 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7052 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7051 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7050 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7049 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7048 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7047 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7046 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7045 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7044 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7043 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7042 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7041 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7040 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Presentment of Supplemental Order In Respect of Plan Administrator's Twenty-Seventh Omnibus Claim Motion As It Relates To Claim 13310 (related document(s) 6896 , 6911 ) filed by Steven Wilamowsky on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. with presentment to be held on 9/3/2010 (check with court for location) (Wilamowsky, Steven) (Entered: 08/25/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7039 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7038 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7037 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7036 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7035 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7034 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7033 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7032 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7031 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7030 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Omni Management Group LLC (related document(s) 7026 ) filed by Stephanie W. Mai on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Mai, Stephanie) (Entered: 07/29/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7029 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order signed on 7/20/2010 Granting Plan Administrator's Objection to Claim No. 14302 of Mark H. Rhynes (Related Doc # 6985 ) . (Correa, Mimi) (Entered: 07/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7028 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Omni Management Group (related document(s) 7025 ) filed by Anna Boelitz on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Boelitz, Anna) (Entered: 07/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7027 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Letter Scheduling Telephone Conference (related document(s) 7022 , 7020 , 7024 , 7018 ) filed by Arthur H. Ruegger on behalf of Refco Inc.. (Ruegger, Arthur) (Entered: 07/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7026 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing /Notice of Cancellation of July 21, 2010 Hearing filed by Stephanie W. Mai on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Mai, Stephanie) (Entered: 07/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7025 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Post-Confirmation Report. For the Period From April 1, 2010 to June 30, 2010 filed by Anna Boelitz on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Boelitz, Anna) (Entered: 07/14/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7024 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Letter Scheduling Telephonic Conference on July 21, 2010 at 3:00 p.m. filed by Arthur H. Ruegger on behalf of Refco Inc.. (Ruegger, Arthur) (Entered: 07/12/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7023 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order signed on 7/9/2010 Approving settlement agreement among XL Specialty Insurance Company and certain officers and directors. (Related Doc # 6989 ) (Rodriguez, Willie) (Entered: 07/09/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7022 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Letter Requesting Telephonic Conference (related document(s) 7020 , 7018 ) filed by Arthur H. Ruegger on behalf of Refco Inc.. (Ruegger, Arthur) (Entered: 07/09/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7021 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order signed on 7/7/2010 Further Extending the (I) Administrative Claim Objection Deadline and (II) Claims Objection Deadline. (related document(s) 6991 ) (Correa, Mimi) (Entered: 07/08/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7020 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Letter Postponing Request for Telephonic Conference (related document(s) 7018 ) filed by Arthur H. Ruegger on behalf of Refco Inc.. (Ruegger, Arthur) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7019 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Letter to The Honorable Robert D. Drain/limited response to the proposed order regarding approval of the Settlement Agreement between XL and the Insureds filed by Michael S. Etkin on behalf of Lead Plaintiffs (RH Capital Associates LLC and Pacific Investment Management Company LLC). (Etkin, Michael) (Entered: 07/02/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7018 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Letter Requesting Telephonic Conference filed by Arthur H. Ruegger on behalf of Special Litigation Counsel to Refco Inc. and Refco Group Ltd., LLC. (Ruegger, Arthur) (Entered: 06/30/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7017 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Documents in the MDL (related document(s) 7014 ) filed by James T. Sandnes on behalf of XL Specialty Insurance Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2)(Sandnes, James) (Entered: 06/29/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7016 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Duke Amponsah (related document(s) 7014 ) filed by Gary Holtzer on behalf of Insureds Leo R. Breitman, Nathan Gantcher, David V. Harkins, Scott L. Jaeckel, Thomas H. Lee, Ronald L. OKelley and Scott A. Schoen. (Holtzer, Gary) (Entered: 06/21/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7015 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order signed on 6/18/2010 Allowing Claim No. 7051 filed by Ivan Casale (Related Doc # 7003 ). (Correa, Mimi) (Entered: 06/18/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7014 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement / Notice of Settlement of Order, Pursuant to Local Bankruptcy Rule 9074-1, Approving Settlement Agreement Among XL Specialty Insurance Company and Certain Officers and Directors (related document(s) 6989 ) filed by Gary Holtzer on behalf of Insureds Leo R. Breitman, Nathan Gantcher, David V. Harkins, Scott L. Jaeckel, Thomas H. Lee, Ronald L. OKelley and Scott A. Schoen. Objections due by 7/2/2010, (Holtzer, Gary) (Entered: 06/18/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7013 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Omni Management Group, LLC (related document(s) 7009 ) filed by Steven Wilamowsky on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Wilamowsky, Steven) (Entered: 06/18/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7012 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 11/10/05 RE: TRANSCRIPT OF HEARING REGARDING SALE HEARING; MOTION AUTHORIZING (1) CONTINUED USE OF EXISTING CASH MANAGEMENT SYSTEM, (II) PRESERVATION AND EXERCISE OF INTERCOMPANY TRANSFERS AND SETOFF RIGHTS AMONG DEBTORS, AND (III) GRANT OF ADMINISTRATIVE STATUS; LIMITED OBJECTION OF STILTON INTERNATIONAL HOLDINGS LIMITED TO DEBTORS MOTION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING CONTINUED USE OF EXISTING CASH MANAGEMENT SYSTEM (RELATED DOCUMENT(S) 111 ); et. al. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 9/14/2010. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: TypeWrite.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 6/23/2010. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 7/7/2010. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 7/19/2010. Transcript access will be restricted through 9/14/2010. (Frazier, Christopher) (Entered: 06/16/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7011 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Letter Re.: Change of Address, filed by Dave Floyd. (Webb, Lonnie) (Entered: 06/16/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7010 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 2/24/2010 RE: TRANSCRIPT OF RCMS MOTION FOR ORDER PERMITTING DISTRIBUTION; RCMS MOTION TO APPROVE ABANDONMENT OF CERTAIN SECURITIES; et. al. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 8/19/2010. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: TypeWrite.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 5/28/2010. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 6/11/2010. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 6/21/2010. Transcript access will be restricted through 8/19/2010. (Frazier, Christopher) (Entered: 06/14/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7009 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing /Proposed Agenda For Hearing Scheduled For June 16, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. filed by Steven Wilamowsky on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Wilamowsky, Steven) (Entered: 06/14/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
7008 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service (related document(s) 7007 ) filed by Christopher Paul Johnson on behalf of RCM Plan Administrator, Refco Plan Administrator and the RCM Plan Administrator. (Johnson, Christopher) (Entered: 06/10/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7007 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response Plan Administrators Response to Cantor Fitzgerald Securities, LLC's Limited Objection to Motion of Plan Administrators for Order further Extending The (I) Administrative Claims Objection Deadline (II) Claims Objection Deadline (related document(s) 7002 ) filed by Christopher Paul Johnson on behalf of RCM Plan Administrator, Refco Plan Administrator and the RCM Plan Administrator. with hearing to be held on 6/16/2010 at 10:00 AM at Manhattan Courtroom 610 (RDD) (Johnson, Christopher) (Entered: 06/09/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7006 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing /NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE (related document(s) 6978 , 6930 ) filed by Arthur H. Ruegger on behalf of Refco Inc.. (Ruegger, Arthur) (Entered: 06/09/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7005 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Letter /Debtors' Letter Requesting Status Conference filed by Arthur H. Ruegger on behalf of Refco Inc.. (Ruegger, Arthur) (Entered: 06/08/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7004 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Omni Management Group (related document(s) 7003 ) filed by Steven Wilamowsky on behalf of Plan Administrator. (Wilamowsky, Steven) (Entered: 06/08/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7003 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Presentment of Order Allowing Claim 7051 of Ivan Casale filed by Steven Wilamowsky on behalf of Plan Administrator. with presentment to be held on 6/11/2010 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom TBA, White Plains Office Objections due by 6/11/2010, (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wilamowsky, Steven) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7002 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Motion Cantor Fitzgerald Securities, LLC's Limited Objection to Motion of Plan Administrators For Order Further Extending the (I) Administrative Claim Objection Deadline and (II) Claims Objection Deadline filed by Lucian Murley on behalf of Cantor Fitzgerald Securities. with hearing to be held on 6/4/2010 (check with court for location) Objections due by 6/4/2010, (Attachments: # 1 Pleading COS) (Murley, Lucian) (Entered: 06/03/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7001 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Omni Management Group (related document(s) 6999 ) filed by Steven Wilamowsky on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Wilamowsky, Steven) (Entered: 06/01/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7000 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Omni Management Group (related document(s) 6985 ) filed by Steven Wilamowsky on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Wilamowsky, Steven) (Entered: 05/26/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6999 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing /Notice of Cancellation of Omnibus Hearing Scheduled For May 27, 2010 filed by Steven Wilamowsky on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Wilamowsky, Steven) (Entered: 05/25/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6998 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Withdrawal Notice of Withdrawal of Proof of Claim filed by Eric Lopez Schnabel on behalf of NYSE Group, Inc. f/k/a New York Stock Exchange, Inc.. (Lopez Schnabel, Eric) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6997 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Nova George (related document(s) 6992 ) filed by Dennis O'Donnell on behalf of Refco Litigation Trust and Refco Private Actions Trust. (O'Donnell, Dennis) (Entered: 05/21/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6996 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Appearance and Request for Removal from ECF Service dated 5/20/10 filed by David A. Pellegrino on behalf of EMF Financial Products, LLC. (Pellegrino, David) (Entered: 05/21/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6995 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Andrea Wilmer (related document(s) 6989 ) filed by Gary Holtzer on behalf of Insureds Leo R. Breitman, Nathan Gantcher, David V. Harkins, Scott L. Jaeckel, Thomas H. Lee, Ronald L. OKelley and Scott A. Schoen. (Holtzer, Gary) (Entered: 05/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6994 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Omni Management Group, LLC (related document(s) 6991 ) filed by Steven Wilamowsky on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Wilamowsky, Steven) (Entered: 05/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6993 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
(This Document Is Superseded by Entry No. 6995 ) Affidavit of Service of Andrea Wilmer (related document(s) 6989 ) filed by Michael F. Walsh on behalf of Insureds Leo R. Breitman, Nathan Gantcher, David V. Harkins, Scott L. Jaeckel, Thomas H. Lee, Ronald L. OKelley and Scott A. Schoen. (Walsh, Michael) Modified on 6/2/2010 (Bush, Brent) (Entered: 05/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6992 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Distribution / Notice of Initial Distribution From Refco Litigation Trust and Refco Private Actions Trust filed by Dennis O'Donnell on behalf of Refco Litigation Trust and Refco Private Actions Trust. (O'Donnell, Dennis) (Entered: 05/18/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6991 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Presentment of Order Further Extending the (I) Administrative Claims Objection Deadline and (II) Claims Objection Deadline and Opportunity For Hearing filed by Steven Wilamowsky on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. with presentment to be held on 6/4/2010 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 118, White Plains Office Objections due by 6/4/2010, (Attachments: # 1 Motion# 2 Proposed Order)(Wilamowsky, Steven) (Entered: 05/18/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6990 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order signed on 5/14/2010 Allowing Claim 10432 of Bank Frick & Co. AG (Related Doc # 6984 ). (Correa, Mimi) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6989 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Approve /Joint Motion of XL Specialty Insurance Company and Former Officers and Directors of Refco, Inc. for Approval of Settlement Agreement filed by Gary Holtzer on behalf of Refco Inc.. with hearing to be held on 6/16/2010 at 10:00 AM at Manhattan Courtroom 610 (RDD) Responses due by 6/9/2010, (Holtzer, Gary) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6988 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service Omni Management Group (related document(s) 6987 ) filed by Cassandra Aquart on behalf of RJM, LLC, as Plan Administrator of Refco, Inc., et al.. (Aquart, Cassandra) (Entered: 05/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6987 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement / Plan Administrator's Notice of Forfeiture of Undeliverable or Unclaimed Distributions of Unsecured Creditors of Refco FX Associates, LLC filed by Steven Wilamowsky on behalf of RJM, LLC, as Plan Administrator of Refco, Inc., et al.. (Wilamowsky, Steven) (Entered: 05/11/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6986 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Omni Management Group, LLC (related document(s) 6984 ) filed by Steven Wilamowsky on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Wilamowsky, Steven) (Entered: 05/07/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6985 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion for Objection to Claim(s) Number: 14516 /Plan Administrator's Objection to Claim No. 14516 of Mark H. Rhynes with hearing to be held on 6/16/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom TBA, White Plains Office Responses due by 6/9/2010, filed by Steven Wilamowsky on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Proposed Order# 3 Notice of Hearing)(Wilamowsky, Steven) (Entered: 05/06/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6984 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Presentment of Order Allowing Claim 10432 of Bank Frick & Co. AG filed by Steven Wilamowsky on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. with presentment to be held on 5/10/2010 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom TBA, White Plains Office Objections due by 5/10/2010, (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wilamowsky, Steven) (Entered: 05/04/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6983 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Omni Management Group LLC (related document(s) 6980 ) filed by Anna Boelitz on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Boelitz, Anna) (Entered: 04/23/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6982 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Omni Management Group, LLC (related document(s) 6979 ) filed by Steven Wilamowsky on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Wilamowsky, Steven) (Entered: 04/21/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6981 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Dismissal filed by Christopher Paul Johnson on behalf of Marc Kirschner, as Trustee of the Refco Litigation Trust. (Johnson, Christopher) (Entered: 04/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6980 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Post-Confirmation Report. for the Period from January 1, 2010 to March 31, 2010 filed by Anna Boelitz on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Boelitz, Anna) (Entered: 04/15/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6979 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing /Notice of Cancellation of Omnibus Hearing Scheduled For April 15, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. filed by Steven Wilamowsky on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Wilamowsky, Steven) (Entered: 04/09/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6978 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order signed on 3/31/2010 Granting Motion Pursuant to FRBP 2004 to Compel Production of Documents (Related Doc # 6930 ) . (Correa, Mimi) (Entered: 04/09/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6977 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
(DOCUMENT FILED IN INCORRECT CASE, PLEASE DISREGARD THIS ENTRY) Objection Limited Objection To The Debtors' Motion Pursuant To Section 105 Of The Bankruptcy Code, Bankruptcy Rule 9014, And General Order M-390 Authorizing The Debtors To Implement Claims Hearing Procedures And Alternative Dispute Resolution Procedures For Claims Against Debtors filed by David M. LeMay on behalf of Objecting Parties. (LeMay, David) Modified on 4/1/2010 (Richards, Beverly). (Entered: 03/31/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6976 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
 |
|
Order of U.S. District Court Judge George B. Daniels signed on 3/26/2010, closing the 5572 appeal. (Cheng, Ka Kin) (Entered: 03/29/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6975 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Stipulation and Agreed Order signed on 3/25/2010 Approving Settlement Among the RCM Plan Administrator, the Refco Plan Administrator and Deutsche Bank AG regarding Claim Numbers 11253 and 13596 (related document(s) 4812 , 4750 , 6745 , 6735 ). (Correa, Mimi) (Entered: 03/25/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6974 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order signed on 3/16/2010 Approving (solely as to JPMorgan Chase to the extent set forth) (I) The Abandonment of Certain Securities Pursuant to Sections 105 and 554(a) of the Bankruptcy Code, (II) Turnover of Certain Securities and (III) Certain Related Relief (Related Doc # 6954 ). (Correa, Mimi) (Entered: 03/16/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6973 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing /Proposed Agenda For Hearing Scheduled For March 16, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. filed by Steven Wilamowsky on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. with hearing to be held on 3/16/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom TBA, White Plains Office (Wilamowsky, Steven) (Entered: 03/15/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6972 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on September 24, 2008 RE: Trial of Objection to Proof of Claim of Bradley C. Reifler ( Proof of Claim No. 14124). Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 6/9/2010. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: TypeWrite Word Processing Service.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.) (RE: related document(s) 6705 ). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 3/18/2010. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 4/1/2010. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 4/12/2010. Transcript access will be restricted through 6/9/2010. (Braithwaite, Kenishia) (Entered: 03/11/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6971 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 6969 ) filed by Stephanie W. Mai on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Mai, Stephanie) (Entered: 03/10/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6970 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Motion of the Plan Administrators for Order Authorizing the Destruction of Certain Records Maintained in Storage by the Reorganized Debtors and RCM (related document(s) 6964 ) filed by Eduardo J. Glas on behalf of Robert Aaron, The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, DPM-Mellon, Ltd., DPM-Mellon, LLC, Derivatives Portfolio Management Ltd., Derivatives Portfolio Management LLC, Guy Castranova. with hearing to be held on 3/16/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom TBA, White Plains Office (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Declaration of Steven Beckelman# 2 Exhibit 1# 3 Exhibit 2# 4 Exhibit 3) (Glas, Eduardo) (Entered: 03/09/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6969 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing /Notice of Additional Omnibus Hearing Dates filed by Steven Wilamowsky on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Wilamowsky, Steven) (Entered: 03/05/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6968 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 6965 ) filed by Christopher Paul Johnson on behalf of Refco Plan Administrator and the RCM Plan Administrator. (Johnson, Christopher) (Entered: 03/04/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6967 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 6964 ) filed by Jared Riley Clark on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Clark, Jared) (Entered: 03/03/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6966 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Name Change From Dresdner Bank AG, London Branch to Commerzbank AG London Branch filed by Commerzbank. (Ho, Amanda) (Entered: 03/02/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6965 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Presentment filed by Christopher Paul Johnson on behalf of Refco Plan Administrator and the RCM Plan Administrator. with presentment to be held on 3/23/2010 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 118, White Plains Office Objections due by 3/23/2010, (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation and Agreed Order)(Johnson, Christopher) (Entered: 03/02/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6964 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Authorize /Motion Of The Plan Administrators For Order Authorizing The Destruction Of Certain Records Maintained In Storage By The Reorganized Debtors And RCM filed by Jared Riley Clark on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. with hearing to be held on 3/16/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom TBA, White Plains Office Responses due by 3/9/2010, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order# 2 Notice of Hearing) (Clark, Jared) (Entered: 02/25/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6963 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
(This Document Is Superseded by Entry No. 6964 ) Motion to Authorize /Motion of the Plan Administrators For Order Authorizing The Destruction Of Certain Records Maintained In Storage By The Reorganized Debtors And RCM filed by Jared Riley Clark on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. with hearing to be held on 3/16/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom TBA, White Plains Office Responses due by 3/9/2010, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order# 2 Notice of Hearing) (Clark, Jared) Modified on 2/25/2010 (Bush, Brent). (Entered: 02/25/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6962 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order signed on 2/24/2010 Approving (I) The Abandonment of Certain Securities Pursuant to Sections 105 and 554(a) of the Bankruptcy Code, (II) Turnover of Certain Securities and (III) Certain Related Relief (Related Doc # 6954 ) . (Correa, Mimi) (Entered: 02/25/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6961 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order signed on 2/25/2010 Granting RCM Plan Administrator's Motion for Order Permitting Distribution of 502(h) Special Reserve in Accordance with RCM Plan Administrator's Interpretation of the Plan (Related Doc # 6949 ) . (Correa, Mimi) (Entered: 02/25/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6960 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing /Proposed Agenda For Hearing Scheduled For February 24, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. filed by Steven Wilamowsky on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. with hearing to be held on 2/24/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom TBA, White Plains Office (Wilamowsky, Steven) (Entered: 02/23/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6959 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Reply to Motion Cantor Fitzgerald Securities, LLC's Reply to Debtors' Response to Cantor Fitzgerald Securities, LLC's Cross-Motion to Quash Debtors' March 2007 Subpoena (related document(s) 6930 ) filed by Lucian Murley on behalf of Cantor Fitzgerald Securities. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Murley, Lucian) (Entered: 02/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6958 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response /Reply of Reorganized Debtors' In Support of Motion For a Supplemental Order Pursuant To Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 2004 To (A) Compel Production of Previously-Ordered Documents and (B) Direct Production of Additional Documents and an Examination, and (II) Objection To Cantor Fitzgerald Securities, LLCs Cross-Motion To Quash Reorganized Debtors March 2007 Subpoena filed by Arthur H. Ruegger on behalf of Special Litigation Counsel to Refco Inc. and Refco Group Ltd., LLC. with hearing to be held on 2/24/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 610 (RDD) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration) (Ruegger, Arthur) (Entered: 02/17/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6957 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service 6956 (related document(s) 6955 ) filed by Lucian Murley on behalf of Cantor Fitzgerald Securities. (Murley, Lucian) (Entered: 02/03/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6956 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing Notice of Cantor Securities, LLC's Cross Motion to Quash Debtors' March 2007 Subpoena Re: D.I. 6955 filed by Lucian Murley on behalf of Cantor Fitzgerald Securities. with hearing to be held on 2/24/2010 at 10:00 AM at White Plains Office Courtroom 118 Objections due by 2/17/2010, (Murley, Lucian) (Entered: 02/03/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6955 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response to Motion Cantor Fitzgerald Securities, LLCs (I) Cross-Motion To Quash Debtors March 2007 Subpoena And (II) Response To Debtors Motion For A Supplemental Order Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Bankruptcy Procedure 2004 To (A) Compel Production Of Previously Ordered Documents And (B) Direct Production of Additional Documents and an Examination filed by Lucian Murley on behalf of Cantor Fitzgerald Securities. with hearing to be held on 2/24/2010 at 10:00 AM at White Plains Office Courtroom 118 Objections due by 2/17/2010, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit Declaration) (Murley, Lucian) (Entered: 02/03/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6954 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Second Motion to Approve (I) The Abandonment of Certain Securities Pursuant to Sections 105 and 554(a) of the Bankruptcy Code, (II) Turnover of Certain Securities and (III) Certain Related Relief, filed by Christopher Paul Johnson on behalf of RCM Plan Administrator. with hearing to be held on 2/24/2010 (check with court for location) Responses due by 2/17/2010, (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Hearing# 2 Proposed Order) (Johnson, Christopher) (Entered: 02/01/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6953 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Omni Management Group, LLC (related document(s) 6949 ) filed by Mark W. Deveno on behalf of Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Deveno, Mark) (Entered: 01/28/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6952 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Omni Management Group (related document(s) 6939 ) filed by Cassandra Aquart on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Aquart, Cassandra) (Entered: 01/26/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6951 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Omni Management Group (related document(s) 6944 ) filed by Anna Boelitz on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Boelitz, Anna) (Entered: 01/26/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6950 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Letter regarding withdrawal of appearance for Norman L. Eisen, Esq. filed by Laura E. Neish on behalf of Tone Grant. (Neish, Laura) (Entered: 01/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6949 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Allow/RCM Plan Administrator's Motion For Order Permitting Distribution of 502(H) Special Reserve in Accordance with RCM Plan Administrator's Interpretation of the Plan filed by Mark W. Deveno on behalf of Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. with hearing to be held on 2/24/2010 at 10:00 AM at White Plains Office Courtroom 118 Objections due by 2/17/2010, (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Hearing) (Deveno, Mark) (Entered: 01/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6948 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Withdrawal filed by James H. Shenwick on behalf of Demers Software LLC. (Shenwick, James) (Entered: 01/15/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6947 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order signed on 1/15/2010 Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Lucian B. Murley of Saul Ewing LLP (Related Doc # 6943 ) . (Andino, Eddie) (Entered: 01/15/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6946 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order signed on 1/15/2010 Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Francis X. Riley, III of Saul Ewing LLP (Related Doc # 6941 ). (Andino, Eddie) (Entered: 01/15/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6945 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order signed on 1/15/2010 Granting Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Robyn F. Pollack, Esq. on behalf of Cantor Fitzgerald Securities (Related Doc # 6942 ) . (Andino, Eddie) Modified on 1/15/2010 (Correa, Mimi). (Entered: 01/15/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6944 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Post-Confirmation Report. Debtors' Post-Confirmation Quarterly Report For The Period From October 1, 2009 to December 31, 2009 filed by Anna Boelitz on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Boelitz, Anna) (Entered: 01/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6943 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission (Lucian B. Murley of Saul Ewing LLP) filed by Lucian Murley on behalf of Cantor Fitzgerald Securities. (Murley, Lucian) (Entered: 01/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6942 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission (Robyn F. Pollack of Saul Ewing LLP) filed by Lucian Murley on behalf of Cantor Fitzgerald Securities. (Murley, Lucian) (Entered: 01/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6941 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission (Francis X. Riley, III of Saul Ewing LLP) filed by Lucian Murley on behalf of Cantor Fitzgerald Securities. (Murley, Lucian) (Entered: 01/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6940 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Supplemental Order signed on 1/11/2010 In Respect of Plan Administrator's Twenty-Seventh Omnibus Motion for Entry of an Order Disallowing Certain Claims as it Relates to Claims 97, 98, and 200 (related document(s) 6935 , 6896 ). (Correa, Mimi) (Entered: 01/12/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6939 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing /Notice of Cancellation of Omnibus Hearing Scheduled For January 12, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. filed by Cassandra Aquart on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Aquart, Cassandra) (Entered: 01/11/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6938 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Omni Management Group, LLC (related document(s) 6935 ) filed by Cassandra Aquart on behalf of Plan Administrator. (Aquart, Cassandra) (Entered: 01/07/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6937 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6936 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6935 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6934 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6933 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6932 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6903 |
Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service of Claimant AT&T Capital Services, Inc.'s Answer to Refco Plan Administrator's Twenty-Seventh Omnibus Motion (related document(s) 6902 ) filed by Michael C. Moody on behalf of Ameritech Credit Corporation. (Moody, Michael) (Entered: 10/01/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6902 |
Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Response to Motion of Plan Administrator's Twenty-Seventh Omnibus Motion for Entry of an Order Disallowing certain Claims (related document(s) 6896 ) filed by Michael C. Moody on behalf of Ameritech Credit Corporation. with hearing to be held on 10/15/2009 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 610 (RDD) Objections due by 10/8/2009, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4) (Moody, Michael) (Entered: 10/01/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6901 |
Filed: 9/29/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Order signed on 9/24/2009 RE: Amended Final Decree Closing the Closing Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases (related doc # 6890 and 6900). (Ho, Amanda) (Entered: 09/29/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6883 |
Filed: 7/23/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service of Ross Shank (related document(s) 6882 ) filed by Christopher Paul Johnson on behalf of Marc Kirschner, as Trustee of the Refco Litigation Trust. (Johnson, Christopher) (Entered: 07/23/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6882 |
Filed: 7/23/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Presentment filed by Christopher Paul Johnson on behalf of Marc Kirschner, as Trustee of the Refco Litigation Trust. with presentment to be held on 8/12/2009 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 610 (RDD) (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation and Agreed Order)(Johnson, Christopher) (Entered: 07/23/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6881 |
Filed: 7/14/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Withdrawal of Proof of Claim filed by Steven B. Wolf on behalf of Graphics Data Services, Inc.. (Ho, Amanda) (Entered: 07/22/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6880 |
Filed: 7/21/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Omni Management Group (related document(s) 6878 ) filed by Anna Boelitz on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Boelitz, Anna) (Entered: 07/21/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6879 |
Filed: 7/14/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 4/20/09 Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 10/13/2009. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Typewrite Word Processing Service.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 7/21/2009. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 8/4/2009. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 8/14/2009. Transcript access will be restricted through 10/13/2009. (Richards, Beverly) (Entered: 07/17/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6878 |
Filed: 7/15/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Post-Confirmation Report. /Debtors' Post-Confirmation Quarterly Report for the Period from April 1, 2009 to June 30, 2009 filed by Anna Boelitz on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Boelitz, Anna) (Entered: 07/15/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6877 |
Filed: 7/14/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing /Notice of Cancellation of Omnibus Hearing Scheduled for July 15, 2009 at 10:00 a.m. filed by Steven Wilamowsky on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Wilamowsky, Steven) (Entered: 07/14/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6876 |
Filed: 7/9/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appearance and Substitution of Counsel filed by Ali M.M. Mojdehi on behalf of Fabrica Textil Riopele, S.A.. (Mojdehi, Ali) (Entered: 07/09/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6875 |
Filed: 6/30/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Withdrawal and Request for Removal from the Debtor's Mailing Matrix and the Court's Electronic Notification List filed by M. David Graubard on behalf of Dominick Lo Bue. (Graubard, M.) (Entered: 06/30/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6874 |
Filed: 6/26/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Omni Management Group (related document(s) 6872 , 6871 ) filed by Steven Wilamowsky on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Wilamowsky, Steven) (Entered: 06/26/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6873 |
Filed: 6/18/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Letter to Change of Address filed by Herman Alexis Co., Inc.. (Ho, Amanda) (Entered: 06/25/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6872 |
Filed: 6/24/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Distribution /RCM Plan Administrator's Notice of Seventh Interim Distribution of Additional Property filed by Steven Wilamowsky on behalf of Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Wilamowsky, Steven) (Entered: 06/24/2009)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
6871 |
Filed: 6/24/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Distribution /Plan Administrator's Notice of Seventh Distribution to Holders of Allowed Claims Against the Contributing Debtors filed by Steven Wilamowsky on behalf of Plan Administrator. (Wilamowsky, Steven) (Entered: 06/24/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6870 |
Filed: 6/19/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service of Ross Shank (related document(s) 6869 ) filed by Christopher Paul Johnson on behalf of Marc Kirschner, as Trustee of the Refco Litigation Trust. (Johnson, Christopher) (Entered: 06/19/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6869 |
Filed: 6/19/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Presentment filed by Christopher Paul Johnson on behalf of Marc Kirschner, as Trustee of the Refco Litigation Trust. with presentment to be held on 7/15/2009 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 610 (RDD) (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation and Agreed Order)(Johnson, Christopher) (Entered: 06/19/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6868 |
Filed: 6/17/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing /Notice of Cancellation of Omnibus Hearing Scheduled For June 18, 2009 at 10:00 a.m. filed by Steven Wilamowsky on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Wilamowsky, Steven) (Entered: 06/17/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6867 |
Filed: 6/11/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Withdrawal of Proof of Claim filed by Greg R. Yates on behalf of Victor M Zarate. (Yates, Greg) (Entered: 06/11/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6866 |
Filed: 6/5/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Withdrawal of Claim(s): filed by Brian M. Delaurentis on behalf of Mary Lou Lee.(Delaurentis, Brian) (Entered: 06/05/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6865 |
Filed: 6/5/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Order signed on 6/5/2009 Extending The (I) Administrative Claims Objection Deadline And (II) Claims Objection Deadline (related document(s) 6857 ). (Li, Dorothy) (Entered: 06/05/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6864 |
Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Omni Management Group (related document(s) 6857 ) filed by Stephanie W. Mai on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Mai, Stephanie) (Entered: 06/01/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
6863 |
Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Omni Management Group (related document(s) 6856 ) filed by Stephanie W. Mai on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Mai, Stephanie) (Entered: 06/01/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6862 |
Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Omni Management Group (related document(s) 6855 ) filed by Stephanie W. Mai on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Mai, Stephanie) (Entered: 06/01/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6861 |
Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Omni Management Group (related document(s) 6854 ) filed by Stephanie W. Mai on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Mai, Stephanie) (Entered: 06/01/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6860 |
Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Omni Management Group (related document(s) 6853 ) filed by Stephanie W. Mai on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Mai, Stephanie) (Entered: 06/01/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6859 |
Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Omni Management Group (related document(s) 6848 ) filed by Stephanie W. Mai on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Mai, Stephanie) (Entered: 06/01/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6858 |
Filed: 5/29/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Supplemental Order signed on 5/29/2009 in respect of Plan Administrator's Twenty-Sixth Omnibus Motion for entry of an order allowing certain claims, reducing and allowing certain claims and disallowing certain claim as it relates to claim 14302 (related document(s) 6850 ). (Li, Dorothy) (Entered: 05/29/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6857 |
Filed: 5/21/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Presentment of Order Further Extending The (I) Administrative Claims Objection Deadline And (II) Claims Objection Deadline And Opportunity For Hearing filed by Steven Wilamowsky on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. with presentment to be held on 6/4/2009 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 610 (RDD) Objections due by 6/4/2009, (Attachments: # 1 Motion For Order Further Extending The (I) Administrative Claim Objection Deadline and (ii) Claims Objection Deadline# 2 Proposed Order)(Wilamowsky, Steven) (Entered: 05/21/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6856 |
Filed: 5/13/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Presentment of Supplemental Order in Respect of Plan Administrator's Twenty-Sixth Omnibus Motion for Entry of an Order Allowing Certain Claims, Reducing and Allowing Certain Claims and Disallowing Certain Claims as it Relates to Claim 14302 (related document(s) 6831 ) filed by Steven Wilamowsky on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. with presentment to be held on 5/18/2009 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 610 (RDD) Objections due by 5/18/2009, (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Supplemental Order)(Wilamowsky, Steven) (Entered: 05/13/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6855 |
Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing /Notice of Cancellation of Omnibus Hearing Scheduled for May 14, 2009 at 10:00 a.m. filed by Steven Wilamowsky on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Wilamowsky, Steven) (Entered: 05/12/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6854 |
Filed: 5/11/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing /Third Amended Notice of Additional Omnibus Hearing Dates filed by Stephanie W. Mai on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Mai, Stephanie) (Entered: 05/11/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6853 |
Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Approving The Abandonment of Certain Property of the Estate (Related Doc # 6834 ) signed on 4/21/2009. (Li, Dorothy) Modified on 4/21/2009 (Philbert, Gemma). (Entered: 04/21/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6852 |
Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Letter Re: Documents related to the Private Action Trust filed by Agnes Michelitsch, Erich GB Reck. (Ho, Amanda) (Entered: 04/21/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6851 |
Filed: 4/20/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Withdrawal of appearance and request for removal from ECF service filed for John W. Guarisco of Neal, Gerber & Eisenberg LLP filed by Christopher Gresh on behalf of Thomas H. Dittmer. (Gresh, Christopher) (Entered: 04/20/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6850 |
Filed: 4/20/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Twenty-Sixth Omnibus Motion for entry of an order allowing certain claims, reducing and allowing certain claims and disallowing certain claim (Related Doc # 6831 ) signed on 4/20/2009. (Li, Dorothy). Modified on 4/21/2009 to Attach Correct Exhibits A&B (Richards, Beverly). (Entered: 04/20/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6849 |
Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing /Proposed Agenda For Hearing Scheduled For April 20, 2009 at 2:00 p.m. filed by Steven Wilamowsky on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. with hearing to be held on 4/20/2009 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 610 (RDD) (Wilamowsky, Steven) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6848 |
Filed: 4/15/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Post-Confirmation Report. /Debtors' Post-Confirmation Quarterly Report For The Period From January 1, 2009 to March 31, 2009 filed by Anna Boelitz on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Boelitz, Anna) (Entered: 04/15/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6847 |
Filed: 4/14/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Omni Management Group (related document(s) 6841 ) filed by Jared Riley Clark on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Clark, Jared) (Entered: 04/14/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6846 |
Filed: 4/13/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Response to Motion / Response and Limited Objection of Chase London Securities to RCM Plan Administrator's Motion for the Abandonment of Certain Property of the Estate Pursuant to Sections 105 and 554(a) of the Bankruptcy Code and for Certain Related Relief filed by Philip D. Anker on behalf of Chase London Securities. with hearing to be held on 4/20/2009 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 610 (RDD) Objections due by 4/13/2009, (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Anker, Philip) (Entered: 04/13/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6845 |
Filed: 4/8/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Omni Management Group (related document(s) 6831 , 6833 ) filed by Stephanie W. Mai on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Mai, Stephanie) (Entered: 04/08/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6844 |
Filed: 4/5/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 3/12/09 RE: Plan Administrator's Omnibus Motion to Disallow Certain Insurance Claims; Motion for Entry of Stipulation and Consent Order. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 7/6/2009. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Typewrite Word Processing Service.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 4/13/2009. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 4/27/2009. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 5/6/2009. Transcript access will be restricted through 7/6/2009. (Richards, Beverly) (Entered: 04/06/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6843 |
Filed: 4/6/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Omni Management Group (related document(s) 6836 ) filed by Stephanie W. Mai on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Mai, Stephanie) (Entered: 04/06/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6842 |
Filed: 4/6/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Omni Management Group (related document(s) 6835 ) filed by Stephanie W. Mai on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Mai, Stephanie) (Entered: 04/06/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6841 |
Filed: 4/2/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Amended Notice of Hearing On RCM Plan Administrators' Motion For The Abandonment of Certain Property of the Estate Pursuant to Sections 105 and 554(a) of the Bankruptcy Code and for Certain Related Relief (related document(s) 6834 ) filed by Jared Riley Clark on behalf of Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. with hearing to be held on 4/20/2009 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 610 (RDD) Objections due by 4/13/2009, (Clark, Jared) (Entered: 04/02/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6840 |
Filed: 4/1/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Supplemental Order Granting Plan Administrators' Twenty-Fifth Motion For Entry of an Order Disallowing Certain Insurance Claims Identified (Related Doc # 6804 ) signed on 3/31/2009. (Li, Dorothy) (Entered: 04/01/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6839 |
Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 6834 ) filed by Stephanie W. Mai on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Mai, Stephanie) (Entered: 03/27/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6838 |
Filed: 3/26/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
So Ordered Stipulation signed on 3/25/2009 by and between Counsel for Refco Plan Administrator and the RCM Plan Administrator and Counsel for Joseph Murphy Re: Settle Claims. (Ho, Amanda) (Entered: 03/26/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6837 |
Filed: 3/26/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
So Ordered Stipulation signed on 3/25/2009 by and between Counsel to William M. Sexton and Counsel to the Plan Administrator Re: Request by William M. Sexton for Payment of Administrative Expense. (Ho, Amanda) (Entered: 03/26/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6836 |
Filed: 3/25/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Amended Notice of Hearing On Plan Administrators' Twenty-Sixth Omnibus Motion For Entry Of An Order Allowing Certain Claims, Reducing And Allowing Certain Claims And Disallowing Certain Claims (related document(s) 6831 , 6833 ) filed by Steven Wilamowsky on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. with hearing to be held on 4/20/2009 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 610 (RDD) Objections due by 4/13/2009, (Wilamowsky, Steven) (Entered: 03/25/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6835 |
Filed: 3/25/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing /Second Amended Notice of Additional Omnibus Hearing Dates filed by Steven Wilamowsky on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Wilamowsky, Steven) (Entered: 03/25/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6834 |
Filed: 3/20/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Approve /RCM Plan Administrator's Motion For The Abandonment of Certain Property of the Estate Pursuant To Sections 105 and 554(a) of the Bankruptcy Code and For Certain Related Relief filed by Jared Riley Clark on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. with hearing to be held on 4/20/2009 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 610 (RDD) Responses due by 4/13/2009, (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Hearing# 2 Proposed Order) (Clark, Jared) (Entered: 03/20/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6833 |
Filed: 3/18/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement /Corrected Proposed Order (related document(s) 6831 ) filed by Steven Wilamowsky on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Wilamowsky, Steven) (Entered: 03/18/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6832 |
Filed: 3/18/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement /Corrected Proposed Order (related document(s) 6831 ) filed by Steven Wilamowsky on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Wilamowsky, Steven) (Entered: 03/18/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6831 |
Filed: 3/18/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Allow Claims /Plan Administrator's Twenty-Sixth Omnibus Motion For Entry Of An Order Allowing Certain Claims, Reducing And Allowing Certain Claims And Disallowing Certain Claims filed by Steven Wilamowsky on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. with hearing to be held on 4/20/2009 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 610 (RDD) Responses due by 4/13/2009, (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Hearing# 2 Declaration in Support# 3 Proposed Order) (Wilamowsky, Steven) (Entered: 03/18/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6830 |
Filed: 3/17/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 6828 ) filed by Stephanie W. Mai on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Mai, Stephanie) (Entered: 03/17/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6829 |
Filed: 3/17/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 6827 ) filed by Stephanie W. Mai on behalf of Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Mai, Stephanie) (Entered: 03/17/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6828 |
Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Presentment of Agreed Stipulation To Settle Claims of Joseph Murphy filed by Stephanie W. Mai on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. with presentment to be held on 3/23/2009 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 610 (RDD) Objections due by 3/23/2009, (Attachments: # 1 Agreed Stipulation to Settle)(Mai, Stephanie) (Entered: 03/13/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6827 |
Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Amended Notice of Distribution RCM Plan Administrator's Amended Notice Regarding Sixth Interim Distribution of Additional Property and Establishment of Special Reserves Subject to Resolution of Disputes (related document(s) 6787 ) filed by Mark W. Deveno on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Annex 1)(Deveno, Mark) (Entered: 03/13/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6826 |
Filed: 3/12/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Motion to Withdraw Claims of Dennis Klejna (Related Doc # 6811 ) signed on 3/12/2009. (Li, Dorothy) (Entered: 03/12/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6825 |
Filed: 3/12/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting The Plan Administrators' Twenty-Fifth Omnibus Motion Disallowing Certain Insurance Claims (Related Doc # 6804 ) signed on 3/12/2009. (Li, Dorothy) (Entered: 03/12/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6824 |
Filed: 3/11/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing /Proposed Agenda For Hearing Scheduled For March 12, 2009 At 10:00 A.M. filed by Stephanie W. Mai on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. with hearing to be held on 3/12/2009 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 610 (RDD) (Mai, Stephanie) (Entered: 03/11/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6823 |
Filed: 3/4/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing /Amended Notice of Additional Omnibus Hearing Dates (related document(s) 6821 ) filed by Steven Wilamowsky on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Wilamowsky, Steven) (Entered: 03/04/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6822 |
Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Withdrawal OF MOTION OF ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY FOR RELIEF FROM PLAN INJUNCTION AND AUTOMATIC STAY, TO THE EXTENT APPLICABLE, TO PERMIT ADVANCEMENT OF DEFENSE COSTS (related document(s) 6820 ) filed by John H. Eickemeyer on behalf of Arch Insurance Company. (Eickemeyer, John) (Entered: 03/03/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6821 |
Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing /Notice of Additional Omnibus Hearing Dates filed by Steven Wilamowsky on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Wilamowsky, Steven) (Entered: 03/03/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6820 |
Filed: 2/25/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion for Relief from Stay filed by John H. Eickemeyer on behalf of Arch Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Proposed Order) (Eickemeyer, John) (Entered: 02/25/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6819 |
Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance and Proposed Order filed by Laura E. Neish on behalf of Tone Grant. (Neish, Laura) (Entered: 02/24/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6818 |
Filed: 2/23/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing For Relief From Plan Injunction And Automatic Stay, To The Extent Applicable, To Permit Advancement Of Defense Costs filed by John H. Eickemeyer on behalf of Arch Insurance Company. with hearing to be held on 4/7/2009 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 610 (RDD) Objections due by 3/31/2009, (Eickemeyer, John) (Entered: 02/23/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6817 |
Filed: 2/23/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Withdrawal /Substitution of Counsel filed by Christopher A. Lynch on behalf of Alpen Agency Limited, Alpen Fund Ltd.. (Lynch, Christopher) (Entered: 02/23/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6816 |
Filed: 2/23/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
(DOCUMENT ENTERED INADVERTENTLY Memorandum of Law (related document(s) 6815 ) filed by John H. Eickemeyer on behalf of Arch Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E) (Eickemeyer, John) Modified on 2/25/2009 (Richards, Beverly). (Entered: 02/23/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6815 |
Filed: 2/23/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
(THIS ENTRY HAS BEEN RE-DOCKETED, SEE DOCUMENT # 6820 FOR CORRECT ENTRY) Motion for Relief from Stay filed by John H. Eickemeyer on behalf of Arch Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Eickemeyer, John) Modified on 2/25/2009 (Richards, Beverly). (Entered: 02/23/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6814 |
Filed: 2/16/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Transcript of Hearing Held on 2/5/09, Filed by Typewrite Word Processing Service (Richards, Beverly). (Entered: 02/19/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6813 |
Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Omni Management (related document(s) 6810 ) filed by Steven Wilamowsky on behalf of Plan Administrator. (Wilamowsky, Steven) (Entered: 02/13/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6812 |
Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing on Agreed Motion to Withdraw Claims of Dennis Klejna Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 3006 (related document(s) 6811 ) filed by Matthew R. Goldman on behalf of Dennis A. Klejna. with hearing to be held on 3/12/2009 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 610 (RDD) Objections due by 3/5/2009, (Goldman, Matthew) (Entered: 02/13/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6811 |
Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Withdraw Document Agreed Motion to Withdraw Claims of Dennis Klejna Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 3006 filed by Matthew R. Goldman on behalf of Dennis A. Klejna. with hearing to be held on 3/12/2009 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 610 (RDD) Responses due by 3/5/2009, (Goldman, Matthew) (Entered: 02/13/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6810 |
Filed: 2/9/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Order Regarding Request of William M. Sexton for Payment of Administrative Expense (related document(s) 3378 , 4809 ) filed by Steven Wilamowsky on behalf of Plan Administrator. with presentment to be held on 2/17/2009 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 610 (RDD) Objections due by 2/17/2009, (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation and Order)(Wilamowsky, Steven) (Entered: 02/09/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6809 |
Filed: 2/9/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
(INCORRECT PDF FILE SUBMITTED, SEE DOCUMENT # 6810 FOR CORRECT ENTRY) Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Order Regarding Request of William M. Sexton For Payment of Administrative Expense (related document(s) 3378 , 4809 ) filed by Steven Wilamowsky on behalf of Plan Administrator. with presentment to be held on 2/17/2009 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 610 (RDD) Objections due by 2/17/2009, (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation and Order)(Wilamowsky, Steven) Modified on 2/10/2009 (Richards, Beverly). (Entered: 02/09/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6808 |
Filed: 2/9/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service regarding Docket No. 6804 and Docket No. 6805 (related document(s) 6804 ) filed by Christopher Paul Johnson on behalf of Refco Plan Administrator and the RCM Plan Administrator. (Johnson, Christopher) (Entered: 02/09/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6807 |
Filed: 2/9/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Refco Plan Administrator's Twenty-Fourth Omnibus Motion for Entry of an Order Disallowing Certain Claims, Allowing Certain Claims, Reducing and Allowing Certain Claims, and Classifying Certain Claims (Related Doc # 6792 ) signed on 2/9/2009. (Li, Dorothy) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/9/2009 (Bush, Brent). (Entered: 02/09/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6806 |
Filed: 2/4/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing Proposed Agenda For Hearing Scheduled For February 5, 2009 At 10:00 A.M. filed by Steven Wilamowsky on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. with hearing to be held on 2/5/2009 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 610 (RDD) (Wilamowsky, Steven) (Entered: 02/04/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6805 |
Filed: 2/2/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing Of Plan Administrators' Twenty-Fifth Omnibus Motion For Entry Of An Order Disallowing Certain Insurance Claims filed by Christopher Paul Johnson on behalf of Refco Plan Administrator and the RCM Plan Administrator. with hearing to be held on 3/12/2009 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 610 (RDD) Objections due by 2/27/2009, (Johnson, Christopher) (Entered: 02/02/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6804 |
Filed: 2/2/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Omnibus Motion to Disallow Claims By The Plan Administrators' Of Certain Insurance Claims filed by Christopher Paul Johnson on behalf of Refco Plan Administrator and the RCM Plan Administrator. with hearing to be held on 3/12/2009 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 610 (RDD) Responses due by 2/27/2009, (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Declaration Of John Surdoval In Support Of The Plan Administrators' Twenty-Fifth Omnibus Motion For Entry Of An Order Disallowing Certain Insurance Claims# 2 Appendix Proposed Order Granting The Plan Administrators' Twenty-Fifth Omnibus Motion Disallowing Certain Insurance Claims# 3 Exhibit A To Proposed Order Granting The Plan Administrators' Twenty-Fifth Omnibus Motion Disallowing Certain Insurance Claims) (Johnson, Christopher) (Entered: 02/02/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6803 |
Filed: 1/21/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Omni Management Group (related document(s) 6800 ) filed by Anna Boelitz on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Boelitz, Anna) (Entered: 01/21/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6802 |
Filed: 1/21/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Omni Management Group (related document(s) 6796 ) filed by Steven Wilamowsky on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Wilamowsky, Steven) (Entered: 01/21/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6801 |
Filed: 1/20/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Further Extending The (I) Administrative Claim Objection Deadline And (II) Claims Objection Deadline (Related Doc # 6793 ) signed on 1/20/2009. (Li, Dorothy) (Entered: 01/20/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6800 |
Filed: 1/15/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Post-Confirmation Report. /Debtors' Post-Confirmation Quarterly Report For The Period From October 1, 2008 To December 31, 2008 filed by Anna Boelitz on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Boelitz, Anna) (Entered: 01/15/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6799 |
Filed: 1/12/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Transcript of Hearing Held on 11/19/08, Filed by Typewrite Word Processing Service (Richards, Beverly). (Entered: 01/13/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6798 |
Filed: 1/12/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Transcript of Hearing Held on 12/18/08, Filed by Typewrite Word Processing Service (Richards, Beverly). (Entered: 01/13/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6797 |
Filed: 1/8/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Omni Management Group (related document(s) 6793 ) filed by Steven Wilamowsky on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Wilamowsky, Steven) (Entered: 01/08/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6796 |
Filed: 1/8/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing /Notice of Cancellation of Omnibus Hearing Scheduled For January 13, 2009 at 10:00 a.m. filed by Steven Wilamowsky on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Wilamowsky, Steven) (Entered: 01/08/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6662 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6591 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6529 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6528 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6527 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6482 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6329 |
Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: None |
|
|
Withdrawal of Claim(s): (Withdrawal of Amended Claim) filed by Michael J. Avenatti on behalf of Richard M. Goodman.(Bush, Brent) (Entered: 12/20/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6323 |
Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: None |
|
|
Transcript Of Hearing Held On November 14, 2007 At 10:19 AM, Re: Status Conference filed by TypeWrite Word Processing Service. (Braithwaite, Kenishia) (Entered: 12/19/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6322 |
Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: None |
|
|
Transcript Of Hearing Held On October 2, 2007, Re: Evidentiary Hearing On Houlihan Fee Application filed by TypeWrite Word Processing Service. (Braithwaite, Kenishia) (Entered: 12/19/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6317 |
Filed: 12/18/2007, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:APS Capital Corp.(Claim No.653, Amount 3,130,300.51)(Claim No.654, Amount 1,092,727.47). To Aurelius Capital Partners, LP. filed by Thomas T. Janover on behalf of Aurelius Capital Partners, LP.(Janover, Thomas) (Entered: 12/18/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6316 |
Filed: 12/18/2007, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:APS Capital Corp.(Claim No.653, Amount 2,415,944.20)(Claim No.654, Amount 843,359.48). To Aurelius Capital Master, Ltd.. filed by Thomas T. Janover on behalf of Aurelius Capital Master, Ltd..(Janover, Thomas) (Entered: 12/18/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6315 |
Filed: 12/17/2007, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP 3001(e)(2) (Claim No.653, Amount 5,546,244.71); The Everest Fund(Claim No.654, Amount 1,936,086.95). To APS Capital Corp.. filed by Steven Klenda on behalf of APS Capital Corp..(Klenda, Steven) (Entered: 12/17/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6314 |
Filed: 12/17/2007, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 6312 ) filed by Gregory S. Otsuka on behalf of Houlihan Lokey Howard & Zukin. (Otsuka, Gregory) (Entered: 12/17/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6313 |
Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Omni Management Group (related document(s) 6292 ) filed by Jeffrey M. Olinsky on behalf of Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Olinsky, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/14/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6312 |
Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: None |
|
|
Supplemental Application for Final Professional Compensation Supplemental Fee Application of Houlihan Lokey Howard & Zukin Capital, Inc. as Investment Banker to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Refco Inc. and Its Affiliated Debtors and Debtors in Possession for Final Allowance of Reimbursement of Actual and Necessary Legal Fees and Expenses Incurred in Prosecuting Its Amended Fourth Interim and Final Fee Application for Houlihan Lokey Howard & Zukin, Other Professional, period: 10/28/2005 to 12/12/2007, fee:$0.00, expenses: $450,897.95.(related document(s) 4748 ) filed by Gregory S. Otsuka. with hearing to be held on 1/16/2008 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 610 (RDD) Responses due by 1/9/2008, (Otsuka, Gregory) (Entered: 12/13/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6311 |
Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Disallow Claims / Plan Administrators' (I) Motion for Entry of an Order Establishing Certain Procedures Related to Claims Objections and (II) Nineteenth Omnibus Motion for Entry of an Order Disallowing Certain Claims, Reducing and Allowing Certain Claims, and Classifying Certain Claims Based on Such Claims Being (A) Duplicate Claims, (B) Late Filed Claims, (C) Claims Asserted in a Manner Inconsistent with the Debtors' Books and Records, and/or (D) Claims that Have Been Released or Otherwise Satisfied During the Chapter 11 Cases filed by Steven Wilamowsky on behalf of Plan Administrator. with hearing to be held on 1/16/2008 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 610 (RDD) Responses due by 1/9/2008, (Attachments: # 1 Declaration# 2 Proposed Order and Exhibits# 3 Notice of Hearing) (Wilamowsky, Steven) (Entered: 12/13/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6310 |
Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service of Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on Motion for Allowance and Payment of an Administrative Expense Claim (related document(s) 6309 ) filed by Lawrence J. Kotler on behalf of Stephen J. Grady. (Kotler, Lawrence) (Entered: 12/13/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6309 |
Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on Motion for Allowance and Payment of an Administrative Expense Claim (related document(s) 3494 ) filed by Lawrence J. Kotler on behalf of Stephen J. Grady. with hearing to be held on 2/13/2008 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 610 (RDD) (Kotler, Lawrence) (Entered: 12/13/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6308 |
Filed: 12/12/2007, Entered: None |
|
|
Stipulation and Agreed Order signed on 12/12/2007 between Plan Administrators and FGS Refco Acquisition Co. (Li, Dorothy) (Entered: 12/13/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6307 |
Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: None |
|
|
Stipulation and Agreed Order signed on 12/12/2007 Resolving Claim of South Financial Services Corp. (Li, Dorothy) (Entered: 12/13/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6306 |
Filed: 12/12/2007, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Approving Settlement Agreement Between the Plan Administrators and the FXCM Parties (Related Doc # 6267 ) signed on 12/12/2007. (Li, Dorothy) (Entered: 12/12/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6305 |
Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Application of Daniel S. Hefter, Esq. for Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice (Related Doc # 6185 ) signed on 12/11/2007. (Li, Dorothy) (Entered: 12/11/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6304 |
Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Application of Thomas G. Macauley, Esq. for Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice (Related Doc # 5844 ) signed on 12/11/2007. (Li, Dorothy) (Entered: 12/11/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6303 |
Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing /Proposed Agenda For Hearing Scheduled For December 12, 2007 at 10:00 a.m. filed by Steven Wilamowsky on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Wilamowsky, Steven) (Entered: 12/11/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6302 |
Filed: 11/15/2007, Entered: None |
|
|
Transcript of Hearing Held on 10/16/07 filed by TypeWrite Word Processing Service. (Richards, Beverly) (Entered: 12/11/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6301 |
Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Mailing of Claims Agent for Notice of Transferred claim Docket no. 6283 filed by Omni Management Group, LLC.(Osborne, Brian) (Entered: 12/10/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6300 |
Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Mailing of Claims Agent for Notice of Transferred claim Docket no. 6282 filed by Omni Management Group, LLC.(Osborne, Brian) (Entered: 12/10/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6299 |
Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Omni Management Group (related document(s) 6287 ) filed by Jeffrey M. Olinsky on behalf of Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Olinsky, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/10/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6298 |
Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Omni Management Group (related document(s) 6286 ) filed by Jeffrey M. Olinsky on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Olinsky, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/10/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6297 |
Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Omni Management Group (related document(s) 6285 ) filed by Jeffrey M. Olinsky on behalf of Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Olinsky, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/10/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6296 |
Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Omni Management Group (related document(s) 6280 ) filed by Jeffrey M. Olinsky on behalf of Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Olinsky, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/10/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6295 |
Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Omni Management Group (related document(s) 6279 ) filed by Jeffrey M. Olinsky on behalf of Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Olinsky, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/10/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|