Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
3074 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Motion for Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice of John J. Burke (related document(s) 3073 ) filed by John J. Burke on behalf of Irving H. Picard. (Burke, John) (Entered: 10/25/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3073 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of John J. Burke filed by John J. Burke on behalf of Irving H. Picard. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Burke, John) (Entered: 10/25/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3072 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response to trustee's determination of claim Re: Claim#003906 and #003907 filed by Aaron Blecker. (Chou, Rosalyn) (Entered: 10/25/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3071 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response to trustee's determination of claim with letter dated March 15, 2010 filed by David Gross. (Chou, Rosalyn) (Entered: 10/25/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3070 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to trustee's determination of claim Re: Claim#000058 and claim #015790 filed by Mr. & Mrs. David Gross. (Chou, Rosalyn) (Entered: 10/25/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3069 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order signed on 10/25/2010 Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice of Lauren M. Hilsheimer, Esq. (Related Doc # 3048 ). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica) (Entered: 10/25/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3068 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order signed on 10/25/2010 Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice of Lindsey D'Andrea, Esq. (Related Doc # 3047 ). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica) (Entered: 10/25/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3067 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order signed on 10/25/2010 Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice of Jennifer Vessells, Esq. (Related Doc # 3046 ). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica) (Entered: 10/25/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3066 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on the (a) Trustee's Motion for Entry of Order (I) Approving Litigation Case Management Procedures For Avoidance Actions and (II) Amending Global Protective Order, and (b) Trustee's Motion For an Order Pursuant to Section 105(a) of the United States Bankruptcy Code and Rules 2002 and 9019 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedures Establishing Procedures For Approval of Settlements (related document(s) 3058 , 3059 ) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard. with hearing to be held on 11/10/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) Objections due by 11/4/2010, (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 10/25/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3065 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service /Supplemental Affidavit of Service of Motion for an Order Establishing Procedures for the Assignment of Allowed Claims (related document(s) 3057 ) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 10/25/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3064 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Trustee's Motion for an Order Establishing Procedures for the Assignment of Allowed Claims (related document(s) 3057 ) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 10/25/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3063 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Trustee's Motion for Order Establishing Procedures for Approval of Settlements and Trustee's Motion for Order Approving Litigation Case Management Procedures For Avoidance Actions and Amending Global Protective Order (related document(s) 3058 , 3059 ) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 10/25/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2169 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2168 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2167 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2166 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2165 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2164 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2163 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2162 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2161 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2160 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2159 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2158 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2157 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2156 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2155 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2154 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2151 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2150 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2149 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 2147 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 01/27/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2148 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 2146 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 01/27/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2147 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2146 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2145 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2144 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2143 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2142 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2141 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2140 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2139 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2138 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2137 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2136 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2135 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2134 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2133 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2132 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2131 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2130 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2129 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2128 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2127 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2126 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2125 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 4 Transferors:TOM KING CONSTRUCTION, INC.(Claim No.4981, Amount 213,924.33). To FOURTH STREET ACQUISITIONS. filed by FOURTH STREET ACQUISITIONS.(Schmidt, Peter) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2124 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 4 Transferors:Trane US, Inc. fka Trane, A div of American Std(Claim No.417, Amount 21,783.06). To FOURTH STREET ACQUISITIONS. filed by FOURTH STREET ACQUISITIONS.(Schmidt, Peter) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2123 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 3 Transferors:HUSTON ELECTRIC, INC.(Amount 90,493.5).. To FOURTH STREET AQUISITIONS. filed by FOURTH STREET ACQUISITIONS.(Schmidt, Peter) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2122 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2121 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2120 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2119 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2118 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2117 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2116 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2115 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2113 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2112 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2111 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2110 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2109 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2108 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2107 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2106 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2105 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2104 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2103 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2102 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2101 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2100 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2099 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2098 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2097 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2096 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2095 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2092 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2091 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2090 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2089 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2088 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2087 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2086 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2085 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2084 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2083 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2082 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2081 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2080 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2079 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2078 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2077 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
2076 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2075 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2074 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2073 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2072 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2071 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2070 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2069 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2068 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2067 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2066 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2065 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2064 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2063 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2062 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2061 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2060 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2059 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2058 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2057 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2056 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2055 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2054 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2053 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2052 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2051 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2050 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2049 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2048 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2047 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2046 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2045 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2044 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2043 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2042 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2041 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2040 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2039 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2038 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2037 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2036 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2035 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2034 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2033 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2032 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Application for Final Professional Compensation Fourth Interim and Final Application of Cooley LLP F/K/A Cooley Godward Kronish LLP, Counsel for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, For Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the (I) Interim Period September 1, 2009 Through May 20, 2010 and (II) Final Period July 21, 2008 Through May 20, 2010 for Cooley Godward Kronish LLP, Creditor Comm. Aty, period: 7/21/2008 to 5/20/2010, fee:$1,283,893.75, expenses: $19,944.84. filed by Cooley Godward Kronish LLP. (Hershcopf, Cathy) (Entered: 07/12/2010)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
2031 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Brittany Whalen of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 2030 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2030 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Matrix / Notice of Filing of Updated Master Service List filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 07/02/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2029 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Samuel Garcia of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 2026 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 07/02/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2028 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
So Ordered Stipulation, Agreement and Order Signed on 6/30/2010 Resolving the Claims of the Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts. (related document(s) 2016 ) (Porter, Marguerite) (Entered: 07/01/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2027 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Panagiota Manatakis of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 2019 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 06/30/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2026 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement / Notice of (I) Entry of Order (A) Approving the (i) Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Section 1125 and 1126 of the Bankruptcy Code, (ii) Solicitation of Votes and Voting Procedures, and (iii) Form of Ballot and (B) Confirming the Joint Plan of Liquidation, and (II) Occurrence of Effective Date (related document(s) 1990 , 1976 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 06/30/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2025 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Signed on 6/30/2010 Granting the Debtors' Twelfth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Incorrectly Classified Claims) (Related Doc # 1984 ) (Porter, Marguerite) (Entered: 06/30/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2024 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Signed on 6/30/2010 Granting the Debtors' Thirteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Duplicate Claims and Incorrectly Classified Claim) (Related Doc # 1994 ) (Porter, Marguerite) (Entered: 06/30/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2023 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Signed on 6/30/2010 Granting the Debtors' Fourteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Amended and Superseded Claims) (Related Doc # 1995 ) (Porter, Marguerite) (Entered: 06/30/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2022 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Signed on 6/30/2010 Granting the Debtors' Fifteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability, Insufficient Documentation, and Satisfied and Released Claims) (Related Doc # 1999 ) (Porter, Marguerite) (Entered: 06/30/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2021 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Signed on 6/30/2010 Granting Debtors' Eleventh Omnibus Objection to Certain Administrative and Other Claims (Books and Records and No Liability Claims) (Balance of Motion Adjourned to 8/5/2010 at 11:00 a.m.) (related document(s) 1960 ) (Porter, Marguerite) (Entered: 06/30/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2020 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Signed on 6/30/2010 Approving the Agreement By and Among the Committee and the Debtors' Prepetition Secured Lenders. (Related Doc # 1148 ) (Porter, Marguerite) (Entered: 06/30/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2019 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing / Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on June 30, 2010 at 11:00 a.m. filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. with hearing to be held on 6/30/2010 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (ALG) (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 06/29/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2018 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response to Motion (related document(s) 1960 ) filed by Steven W. Kelly on behalf of Brookhill V Acquisition. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Kelly, Steven) (Entered: 06/28/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2017 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by Steven W. Kelly on behalf of Brookhill V Acquisition. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice) (Kelly, Steven) (Entered: 06/28/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2016 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Presentment of Stipulation, Agreement and Order Resolving the Claims of the Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. with presentment to be held on 6/30/2010 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 617 (ALG) Objections due by 6/30/2010, (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 06/25/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2015 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response to Motion [Response to the Debtors' Fourth Omnibus Objection to Claims] (related document(s) 1735 ) filed by Kevin Michael Newman on behalf of West Manchester Mall LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Affidavit of Service) (Newman, Kevin) (Entered: 06/25/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2014 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Brittany Whalen of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 2013 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 06/23/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2013 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) / Debtors' Sixteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. with hearing to be held on 8/5/2010 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (ALG) Responses due by 7/22/2010, (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 06/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2012 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response to Debtors' Twelfth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Incorrectly Classified Claims) (related document(s) 1984 ) filed by Gaston County. (Chou, Rosalyn) (Entered: 06/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2011 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Brittany Whalen of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 2008 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 06/16/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2010 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response to Debtors' Eleventh Omnibus Objection to Certain Administrative and Other Claims (related document(s) 1960 ) filed by Katherine Sherrington. (Chou, Rosalyn) (Entered: 06/16/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2009 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Motion of Debtor to Expunge Claims (related document(s) 1960 ) filed by Jeffrey Meyers on behalf of FPA Hillcrest Associates. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 (1 of 2)# 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 (2 of 2)# 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2# 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3# 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4) (Meyers, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2008 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Monthly Operating Report for the Period May 1, 2010 through May 31, 2010 filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2007 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Brittany Whalen of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 2005 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2006 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Withdrawal of Claims filed by Debra S. Turetsky on behalf of General Electric Capital Corporation. (Turetsky, Debra) (Entered: 06/11/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2005 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Matrix / Corrected Notice of Filing of Updated Master Service List (related document(s) 2004 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 06/07/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2004 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Matrix / Notice of Filing of Updated Master Service List filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 06/07/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2003 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Withdrawal of Claim(s): filed on behalf of The State of Michigan, Department of Treasury regarding proof of claim no. 5667 filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Malo, David) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2002 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Withdrawal of Claim(s): filed on behalf of The State of Michigan, Department of Treasury regarding proof of claim no. 5655 filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Malo, David) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2001 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 1999 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 06/01/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2000 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on May 20, 2010 Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 8/25/2010. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Typewrite Word Processing Service.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 6/3/2010. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 6/17/2010. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 6/28/2010. Transcript access will be restricted through 8/25/2010. (Richards, Beverly) (Entered: 05/27/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1999 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) / Debtors' Fifteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. with hearing to be held on 6/30/2010 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (ALG) Responses due by 6/25/2010, (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 05/26/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1998 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Konstantina Haidopoulos of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 1995 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 05/26/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1997 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Kossivas of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 1994 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 05/26/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1996 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Panagiota Manatakis of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 1978 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 05/26/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1995 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) / Debtors' Fourteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. with hearing to be held on 6/30/2010 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (ALG) Responses due by 6/23/2010, (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1994 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) / Debtors' Thirteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. with hearing to be held on 6/30/2010 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (ALG) Responses due by 6/23/2010, (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1993 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 1984 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1992 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Signed on 5/20/2010 Deeming the Debtors' Schedules Amended (Related Doc # 1938 ) (Porter, Marguerite) (Entered: 05/21/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1991 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Signed on 5/20/2010 Granting Debtors' Tenth Omnibus Objection to Certain Administrative and Other Claims (Books and Records and No Liability Claims) (Balance of Motion Adjourned to 6/30/2010 @11:00 a.m.) (related document(s) 1939 ) (Porter, Marguerite) (Entered: 05/21/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1990 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law, and Order Signed on 5/20/2010 Approving on a Final Basis the Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Section 1125 and 1126 of the Bankruptcy Code, Solicitation of Votes and Voting Procedures, and Form of Ballot, and Confirming the Joint Plan of Liquidation. (Related Document 1976 ) (Porter, Marguerite) Modified on 5/21/2010 (Richards, Beverly). (Entered: 05/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1989 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response of PR Financing Limited Partnership and PR Beaver Valley Limited Partnership to Debtors' Eleventh Omnibus Objection to Certain Administrative and Other Claims (related document(s) 1960 ) filed by Jeffrey Kurtzman on behalf of PR Financing Limited Partnership and PR Beaver Valley Limited Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C) (Kurtzman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1988 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing / Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on May 20, 2010 at 2:30 p.m. filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 05/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1987 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
So Ordered Stipulation Signed on 5/19/2010 Reducing Claims (4B's Realty V Harbor Park Drive LLC.) (related document(s) 1958 ) (Porter, Marguerite) (Entered: 05/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1986 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Agreement and Order Signed on 5/19/2010 Resolving the Joinder of WP Realty to Motions for Payment of Postpetition Rent (related document(s) 1954 ) (Porter, Marguerite) (Entered: 05/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1985 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing / Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on May 20, 2010 at 2:30 p.m. filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 05/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1984 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) / Debtors' Twelfth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Incorrectly Classified Claims) with hearing to be held on 6/30/2010 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (ALG) Responses due by 6/23/2010, filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC.(Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 05/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1983 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Withdrawal (related document(s) 1917 ) filed by Mark Edwin Browning on behalf of Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts. (Browning, Mark) (Entered: 05/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1982 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement / Notice of Filing of Modifications to the Joint Plan of Liquidation (related document(s) 1911 , 1976 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 05/18/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1981 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Sena Sengun of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 1974 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 05/18/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1980 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Sena Sengun of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 1975 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 05/18/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1979 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Proposed Order / [PROPOSED] Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law, and Order (i) Approving on a Final Basis the (A) Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Section 1125 and 1126 of the Bankruptcy Code, (B) Solicitation of Votes and Voting Procedures, and (C) Form of Ballot, and (ii) Confirming the Joint Plan of Liquidation filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 05/18/2010)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1978 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Memorandum of Law in Support of the Plan Proponents Request for (i) Approval of the Disclosure Statement and Solicitation Procedures and (ii) Confirmation of the Joint Plan of Liquidation (related document(s) 1976 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 05/18/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1977 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Withdrawal of Claim(s): filed on behalf of the Iowa Department of Revenue regarding proof of claim no. 5346 filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Malo, David) (Entered: 05/18/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
1976 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Amended Plan / Joint Plan of Liquidation Under Chapter 11 of the United States Bankruptcy Code Proposed by the Debtors and the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, as Modified (related document(s) 1911 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 05/18/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1975 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Declaration of Christina F. Pullo on behalf of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC Regarding Voting on, and Tabulation of, Ballots Accepting and Rejecting Joint Plan of Liquidation Under Chapter 11 of the United States Bankruptcy Code Proposed by the Debtors and the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (related document(s) 1912 , 1913 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1974 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Monthly Operating Report for the period April 1, 2010 through April 30, 2010 filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1973 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection To Debtors' Motion Pursuant to Section 105(a) Of The Bankruptcy Code Deeming Their Schedules Amended filed by Ilan D. Scharf on behalf of Chickii Productions Inc.. (Scharf, Ilan) (Entered: 05/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1972 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Signed on 5/13/2010 Modifying the Automatic Stay to permit Lien Enforcement Proceedings Against Property Owned by a Non-Debtor Entity (Related Doc # 1931 ) (Porter, Marguerite) (Entered: 05/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1971 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
So Ordered Stipulation, Agreement and Order Signed on 5/13/2010 Resolving the Claims of 53 Springfield Street Realty Trust, Agawam Plaza, LLC and Agawam Development, LLC. (related document(s) 1952 ) (Porter, Marguerite) (Entered: 05/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1970 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
So Ordered Stipulation, Agreement and Order Signed on 5/13/2010 Between the Debtors and Pepco Energy Services, Inc.. (related document(s) 1951 ) (Porter, Marguerite) (Entered: 05/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1969 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Third Order Signed on 5/13/2010 Granting the Debtors' Objection Claim Asserted in Certain Proof of Claim (Claim Number 4239 Remainder Outlot, LLC and Larry C. Lang) (Porter, Marguerite) (Entered: 05/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1968 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Sena Sengun of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 1963 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 05/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1967 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response to Motion Indiana Department of Revenue's Response to Debtors' Tenth Omnibus Objection to Certain Administrative and Other Claims filed by LeGrand L. Clark III on behalf of Indiana Department of Revenue. (Clark, LeGrand) (Entered: 05/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1966 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission (related document(s) 1939 ) filed by LeGrand L. Clark III on behalf of Indiana Department of Revenue. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Clark, LeGrand) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1965 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Kossivas of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 1958 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1964 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Kossivas of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 1955 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1963 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing / Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on May 13, 2010 at 11:00 a.m. filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. with hearing to be held on 5/13/2010 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (ALG) (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1962 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Panagiota Manatakis of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 1960 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1961 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Opposition Of The New York State Department of Taxation and Finance To Debtors' Tenth Omnibus Objection To Claims (related document(s) 1939 ) filed by Neal S. Mann on behalf of New York State Department of Taxation And Finance. (Mann, Neal) (Entered: 05/11/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1960 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) : Debtors' Eleventh Omnibus Objection to Certain Administrative and Other Claims filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. with hearing to be held on 6/30/2010 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (ALG) Responses due by 6/16/2010, (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 05/10/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1959 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP (Re: 08-12629) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Jones Sign Co., Inc.(Amount 99939.79).. To Euler Hermes ACI. filed by Euler Hermes ACI.(Chou, Rosalyn) (Entered: 05/10/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1958 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Presentment of Stipulation Reducing the Claims of 4B's Realty V Harbor Park Drive, LLC and 4B's Realty Harbor Park Dr. Leasing, LLC filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. with presentment to be held on 5/17/2010 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 617 (ALG) Objections due by 5/17/2010, (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 05/07/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1957 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Kossivas of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 1954 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 05/07/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1956 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Kossivas of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 1951 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 05/07/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1955 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Matrix / Notice of Filing of Updated Master Service List filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 05/07/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1954 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Presentment of an Agreement and Order Resolving the Joinder of WP Realty to Motions for Payment of Postpetition Rent Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 365(d)(3) and 503(b)(1) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. with presentment to be held on 5/17/2010 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 617 (ALG) Objections due by 5/17/2010, (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 05/06/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1953 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Kossivas of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 1952 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 05/05/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1952 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Presentment of Stipulation, Agreement and Order Resolving the Claims of 53 Springfield Street Realty Trust, Agawam Plaza, LLC and Agawam Development, LLC filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. with presentment to be held on 5/13/2010 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 617 (ALG) Objections due by 5/13/2010, (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1951 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Presentment of Stipulation, Agreement and Order Between the Debtors and Pepco Energy Services, Inc. filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. with presentment to be held on 5/13/2010 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 617 (ALG) Objections due by 5/13/2010, (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1950 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Panagiota Manatakis of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 1947 , 1946 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 04/28/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1949 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Lindsay Danas of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 1938 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 04/28/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1948 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Withdrawal of Claim(s): filed on 12/12/08 in the amount of $21875.00 filed by State of Wisconsin Department of Revenue.(Chou, Rosalyn) (Entered: 04/23/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1947 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement / Notice of Filing Plan Supplement (related document(s) 1912 , 1946 , 1911 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 04/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1946 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement / Plan Supplement (related document(s) 1912 , 1911 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 04/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1945 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Brittany Whalen of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 1938 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 04/21/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1944 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Sena Sengun of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 1937 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 04/21/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1943 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Kossivas of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 1939 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 04/21/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1942 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service (related document(s) 1941 ) filed by Juandisha Harris on behalf of State Of Michigan, Department Of Treasury. (Harris, Juandisha) (Entered: 04/21/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1941 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Confirmation of Plan (related document(s) 1911 ) filed by Juandisha Harris on behalf of State Of Michigan, Department Of Treasury. (Harris, Juandisha) (Entered: 04/21/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1940 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
So Ordered Stipulation, Agreement and Order Signed on 4/19/2010 Resolving the Claims of Qwest Communications Company, LLC and Qwest Corporation. (related document(s) 1930 ) (Porter, Marguerite) (Entered: 04/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1939 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Tenth Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) / Debtors' Tenth Omnibus Objection to Claims filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. with hearing to be held on 5/20/2010 at 02:30 PM at Courtroom 617 (ALG) Responses due by 5/13/2010, (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 04/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1938 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
Motion to Amend/Correct |
|
Motion to Amend / Debtors' Motion Pursuant to Section 105(a) of the Bankruptcy Code Deeming Their Schedules Amended filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. with hearing to be held on 5/20/2010 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (ALG) Responses due by 5/13/2010, (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 04/16/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1937 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Monthly Operating Report for the period March 1, 2010 through March 31, 2010 filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 04/15/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1936 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
So Ordered Stipulation, Agreement and Order Signed on 4/12/2010 Resolving the Claims of Visual Impressions, Inc. (related document(s) 1919 ) (Porter, Marguerite) (Entered: 04/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1935 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Tiffany Alonzo of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 1930 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 04/09/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1934 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Panagiota Manatakis of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 1929 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 04/08/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1933 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Third Order Signed on 4/8/2010 Regarding the Debtors' Seventy Omnibus Objection to Claims (Partially Satisfied Claims) (related document(s) 1787 ) (Porter, Marguerite) (Entered: 04/08/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1932 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Second Order Signed on 4/8/2010 Regarding the Debtors' Eighth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Partially Satisfied Claims) (related document(s) 1788 ) (Porter, Marguerite) (Entered: 04/08/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1931 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion for Relief from Stay to Permit Commencement of Filing of a Mechanics Lien Foreclosure Against Property Owned By a Non-Debtor Entity filed by Thomas J. FitzGerald on behalf of Evergreen Oak Electric Supply and Sales Co.. with hearing to be held on 5/11/2010 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (ALG) (FitzGerald, Thomas) (Entered: 04/08/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1930 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Presentment of Stipulation, Agreement and Order Resolving the Claims of Qwest Communications Company, LLC and Qwest Corporation filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. with presentment to be held on 4/19/2010 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 617 (ALG) Objections due by 4/19/2010, (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 04/07/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1929 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement / Notice of CANCELLATION of April 8, 2010 Omnibus Hearing filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 04/06/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1928 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Withdrawal of Objection to Transfer of Claim (related document(s) 1924 ) filed by Russell W. Savory on behalf of FOM Pigeon Forge, LLC. (Savory, Russell) (Entered: 04/06/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1927 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
 |
|
So Ordered Stipulation, Agreement and Order Signed on 4/6/2010 Between the Debtor Parties and American Express. (Stipulation Signed by Judge Gropper and Judge Glenn) (Porter, Marguerite) (Entered: 04/06/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1926 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Konstantina Haidopoulos of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 1922 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 04/06/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1925 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on October 16, 2008 RE: Motion for a Order Granting Relief from Automatic Stay or in the Alternative for Adequate Protection Payments; Notice of Presentment: Application to Amend Agreement with Conway, Del Genio, Gries & Co., LLC as Financial Advisor for the Debtors Nunc Pro Tunc to the Commencement Date; Initial Case Conferencel; Motion for an Order Directing the Production of Documents and Witnesses by the Debtors and/or Steven Shore and Barry Prevor and Authorizing the Issuance of Subpoenas, etc.... Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 1/27/2009. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: TypeWrite Word Processing Service.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 11/5/2008. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 11/19/2008. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 12/1/2008. Transcript access will be restricted through 1/27/2009. (Braithwaite, Kenishia) (Entered: 04/05/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1924 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Transfer (related document(s) 1652 ) filed by Russell W. Savory on behalf of FOM Pigeon Forge, LLC.(Savory, Russell) (Entered: 04/05/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1923 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Samuel Garcia, of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 1919 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 04/02/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1922 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Matrix / Notice of Filing of Updated Master Service List filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 04/02/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1921 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on August 4, 2008 RE: Motion for Approval Of Procedures in Connection with the Sale of All or Substantially All of the Debtors' Assets, Authorization to Enter into Stalking Horse, Agreement in Connection Therewith, Approval of the Payment of Stalking Horse Protection; Limited Objection To Motion for Debtors Seeking Entry of an Order Authorizing the Debtors' Use of Cash Collateral Granting Adequate Protection Modifying the Automatic Stay; Limited Objection to Debtors' Amended Motion for Approval of Procedures in Connection with the Sale, et al.. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 6/30/2010. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: TypeWrite Word Processing Service.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 4/8/2010. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 4/22/2010. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 5/3/2010. Transcript access will be restricted through 6/30/2010. (Braithwaite, Kenishia) (Entered: 04/01/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1920 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service / Affidavit of Solicitation Mailing (related document(s) 1912 , 1913 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 03/31/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1919 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Presentment of Stipulation, Agreement and Order Resolving the Claims of Visual Impressions, Inc. filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. with presentment to be held on 4/12/2010 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 617 (ALG) Objections due by 4/12/2010, (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 03/31/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1918 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Paul Belobritsky, of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 03/30/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1917 |
Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Confirmation of Plan To Confirmation of Joint Plan of Liquidation (related document(s) 1911 ) filed by Mark Edwin Browning on behalf of Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts. (Browning, Mark) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1916 |
Filed: 3/22/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Christopher Simco of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 1652 , 1045 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 03/22/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1915 |
Filed: 3/19/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Kossivas of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 1910 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 03/19/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1914 |
Filed: 3/18/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Tiffany Alonzo of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 1908 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 03/18/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1913 |
Filed: 3/18/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Signed on 3/18/2010 Preliminarily Approving the Disclosure Statement and Solicitation Procedures; Scheduling a Combined Hearing to Consider Final Approval of the Disclosure Statement and Solicitation Procedures, and Confirmation of the Joint Plan of Liquidation; and Establishing Notice and Objection Procedures to Disclosure Statement Approval and Plan Confirmation. (related document(s) 1912 , 1911 ) with Hearing to be Held on 5/20/2010 at 02:30 PM at Courtroom 617 (ALG) (Porter, Marguerite) (Entered: 03/18/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1912 |
Filed: 3/17/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Disclosure Statement / Disclosure Statement for Joint Plan of Liquidation Under Chapter 11 of the United States Bankruptcy Code Proposed by the Debtors and the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 03/17/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1911 |
Filed: 3/17/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Chapter 11 Plan / Joint Plan of Liquidation Under Chapter 11 of the United States Bankruptcy Code Proposed by the Debtors and the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 03/17/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1910 |
Filed: 3/17/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Presentment of Stipulation, Agreement and Order Between the Debtor Parties and American Express filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. with presentment to be held on 3/31/2010 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 617 (ALG) Objections due by 3/31/2010, (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 03/17/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1909 |
Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Panagiota Manatakis of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 1906 , 1905 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 03/16/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1908 |
Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Monthly Operating Report for the period February 1, 2010 through February 28, 2010 filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 03/16/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1907 |
Filed: 3/10/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Second Order Granting the Debtors' Objections to Claims Asserted in Certain Proofs of Claim. (Adjourned to 4/8/2010 @11:00 a.m.) (related document(s) 1872 ) (Porter, Marguerite) (Entered: 03/10/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1906 |
Filed: 3/10/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Signed on 3/10/2010 Granting the Debtors' First Objection to Proof of Claim No. 543 Filed by Super Store Supplies (HK) Limited. (Related Doc # 1516 ) (Porter, Marguerite) (Entered: 03/10/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1905 |
Filed: 3/10/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Signed on 3/10/2010 Granting the Debtors' First Objection to Proof of Claim No. 5290 Filed by Dart Transit Company. (Related Doc # 1480 ) (Porter, Marguerite) (Entered: 03/10/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1904 |
Filed: 3/9/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Kossivas of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 1903 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 03/09/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1903 |
Filed: 3/5/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Matrix / Notice of Filing of Updated Master Service List filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 03/05/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1902 |
Filed: 3/5/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
So Ordered Stipulation, Agreement and Order Signed on 3/5/2010 Resolving the Debtors' Objection to Proofs of Claim Filed by Gordman 8th Street, LLC. (Porter, Marguerite) (Entered: 03/05/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1901 |
Filed: 3/5/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
So Ordered Stipulation, Agreement and Order Signed on 3/5/2010 of No Objection to Capmark Finance, Inc.'s Notice of Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security. (related document(s) 1887 ) (Porter, Marguerite) Modified on 3/5/2010 (Richards, Beverly). (Entered: 03/05/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1900 |
Filed: 3/5/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
(INCORRECT PDF FILE SUBMITTED, SEE DOCUMENT # 1901 FOR CORRECT ENTRY) So Ordered Stipulation, Agreement and Order Signed on 3/5/2010 of No Objection to Capmark Finance, Inc/'s Notice of Transfer of Claim other than for Security. (related document(s) 1887 ) (Porter, Marguerite) Modified on 3/5/2010 (Richards, Beverly). (Entered: 03/05/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1899 |
Filed: 3/4/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Konstantina Haidopoulos of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 1894 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 03/04/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1898 |
Filed: 3/4/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Brittany Whalen of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 1891 , 1892 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 03/04/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1897 |
Filed: 3/4/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Third Order Granting Application for Interim Professional Compensation (Related Doc # 1842 )for SilvermanAcampora LLP, fees awarded: $28806.36, expense awarded: $1132.29, signed on 3/4/2010. (Chou, Rosalyn) (Entered: 03/04/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1896 |
Filed: 3/4/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Second Order Signed on 3/4/2010 Granting the Debtors' Sixth Omnibus Objection to Certain Administrative and Other Claims (Books and Records and No Liability) (related document(s) 1785 ) (Porter, Marguerite) (Entered: 03/04/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1895 |
Filed: 3/4/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appearance filed by Alyson M. Fiedler on behalf of 408-420 Fulton Street LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Fiedler, Alyson) (Entered: 03/04/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1894 |
Filed: 3/3/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing / Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on March 4, 2010 at 11:00 a.m. filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. with hearing to be held on 3/4/2010 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (ALG) (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 03/03/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1893 |
Filed: 3/2/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Withdrawal of Claim(s): filed on behalf of The Arizona Department of Revenue regarding proof of claim no. 5639 filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 03/02/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1892 |
Filed: 3/2/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Response / Debtors' Reply in Further Support of the Debtors' Objection to Proof of Claim No. 5290 filed by Dart Transit Company (related document(s) 1480 , 1406 , 1611 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. with hearing to be held on 3/4/2010 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (ALG) (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 03/02/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1891 |
Filed: 3/2/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Response / Debtors' Reply in Further Support of the Debtors' First Objection to Proof of Claim No. 543 filed by Super Store Supplies (HK) Limited (related document(s) 1576 , 1449 , 1516 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. with hearing to be held on 3/4/2010 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (ALG) (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 03/02/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1890 |
Filed: 3/1/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Kossivas of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 1889 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 03/01/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1889 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Presentment of Stipulation, Agreement and Order Resolving the Debtors' Objection to Proofs of Claim filed by Gordman 84th Street, LLC filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. with presentment to be held on 3/5/2010 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 617 (ALG) Objections due by 3/5/2010, (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 02/26/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1888 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Kossivas of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 1887 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 02/26/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1887 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Presentment of Stipulation, Agreement and Order of No Objection to Capmark Finance, Inc.'s Notice of Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security filed by Adam P. Strochak on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. with presentment to be held on 3/5/2010 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 617 (ALG) Objections due by 3/5/2010, (Strochak, Adam) (Entered: 02/25/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1886 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Kossivas of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 1885 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 02/23/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1885 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Monthly Operating Report for the period January 1, 2010 through January 31, 2010 filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 02/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1884 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance and Request for Deletion from CM/ECF Electronic Notification Service filed by Fredrick J. Levy on behalf of Hadley Corporation. (Levy, Fredrick) (Entered: 02/18/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1883 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service (related document(s) 1882 ) filed by Juandisha Harris on behalf of State Of Michigan, Department Of Treasury. (Harris, Juandisha) (Entered: 02/18/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1882 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appearance filed by Juandisha Harris on behalf of State Of Michigan, Department Of Treasury. (Harris, Juandisha) (Entered: 02/18/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1881 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Withdrawal of Claim(s): filed on behalf of The State of Michigan, Department of Treasury regarding proof of claim nos. 4997 & 5320 filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 02/17/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1880 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Konstantina Haidopoulos of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 1879 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 02/16/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1879 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing to Consider the Debtors' Objections to Certain 503(b)(9) Claims (related document(s) 1877 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. with hearing to be held on 3/4/2010 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (ALG) (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 02/12/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1878 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
So Ordered Stipulation, Agreement and Order Signed on 2/11/2010 Resolving the Claim of the County of San Bernardino, California.. (related document(s) 1870 ) (Porter, Marguerite) (Entered: 02/11/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1877 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Signed on 2/11/2010 Granting the Debtors' Objections to Claims Asserted in Certain Proofs of Claim. (related document(s) 1872 ) (Porter, Marguerite) (Entered: 02/11/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
1876 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Kossivas of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 1875 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 02/10/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1875 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Matrix / Notice of Filing of Updated Master Service List filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 02/05/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1874 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
So Ordered Stipulation, Agreement and Order Signed on 2/4/2010 Resolving the Debtors' Objection to Proofs of Claim Filed by Mall at Turtle Creek, LLC. (related document(s) 1867 ) (Porter, Marguerite) (Entered: 02/05/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1873 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Brittany Whalen of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 1870 , 1872 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 02/04/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1872 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Proposed Order / Notice of Presentment of Order Granting the Debtors' Objections to 503(b)(9) Claims Asserted in Certain Proofs of Claim filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. with presentment to be held on 2/11/2010 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 617 (ALG) Objections due by 2/11/2010, (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 02/01/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1871 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Kossivas of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 1869 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 02/01/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1870 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Presentment of Stipulation, Agreement and Order Resolving the Claim of the County of San Bernardino, California filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. with presentment to be held on 2/11/2010 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 617 (ALG) Objections due by 2/11/2010, (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 02/01/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1869 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement / Supplemental Retention Questionnaire of Hutton & Solomon LLP (related document(s) 1170 , 1174 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 01/29/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1868 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Kossivas of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 1867 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 01/27/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1867 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Presentment of Stipulation, Agreement and Order Resolving the Debtors' Objection to Proofs of Claim filed by Mall at Turtle Creek, LLC (related document(s) 1785 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. with presentment to be held on 2/3/2010 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 617 (ALG) Objections due by 2/3/2010, (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 01/26/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1866 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on Thursday 7/16/09 11:16 AM Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 4/21/2010. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Rand Reporting & Transcription, LLC.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 1/28/2010. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 2/11/2010. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 2/22/2010. Transcript access will be restricted through 4/21/2010. (Richards, Beverly) (Entered: 01/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1865 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Konstantina Haidopoulos of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 1860 , 1842 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 01/21/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1864 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Kossivas of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 1859 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 01/21/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1863 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Third Order signed on 1/21/2010 Granting Application for Interim Professional Compensation (Related Doc # 1799 )for Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP, fees awarded: $276691.00, expense awarded: $6292.08, Granting Application for Interim Professional Compensation (Related Doc # 1800 )for Clear Thinking Group LLC, fees awarded: $216291.40, expense awarded: $9589.46, Granting Application for Interim Professional Compensation (Related Doc # 1801 )for Loughlin Meghji + Company, fees awarded: $205825.80, expense awarded: $830.83, Granting Application for Interim Professional Compensation (Related Doc # 1802 )for Cooley Godward Kronish LLP, fees awarded: $121315.20, expense awarded: $3095.98. (Chou, Rosalyn) (Entered: 01/21/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1862 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Second Order Signed on 1/21/2010 Regarding the Debtors' Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claims (Partially Satisfied Claims) (related document(s) 1787 ) (Porter, Marguerite) (Entered: 01/21/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1861 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Kossivas of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 1856 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 01/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1860 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing to Consider Third Application by SilvermanAcampora LLP for Allowance of Interim Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses (related document(s) 1842 ) filed by Adam L. Rosen on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. with hearing to be held on 3/4/2010 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (ALG) Objections due by 2/25/2010, (Rosen, Adam) (Entered: 01/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1859 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing / Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on January 21, 2010 at 11:00 a.m. filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. with hearing to be held on 1/21/2010 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (ALG) (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 01/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1858 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
So Ordered Stipulation, Agreement and Order Signed on 1/20/2010 Resolving the Motion of Certain Landlords for Payment of Postpetition Rent and Debtors' Objection to Certain Proofs of Claim. (related document(s) 1855 ) (Porter, Marguerite) (Entered: 01/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1857 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Konstantina Haidopoulos of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 1855 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 01/15/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1856 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Monthly Operating Report for the period December 1, 2009 through December 31, 2009 filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 01/15/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1855 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Presentment of Agreement and Order Resolving (i) the Motion of Certain Landlords for Payment of Postpetition Rent Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 365(d)(3) and 503(b)(1) and (ii) Debtors' Objection to Certain Proofs of Claim filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. with presentment to be held on 1/20/2010 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 617 (ALG) Objections due by 1/20/2010, (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 01/14/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1854 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Withdrawal of Claim(s): filed on behalf of Orange County Treasurer-Tax Collector regarding proof of claim no. 5633 filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC Claims Agent.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 01/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1853 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
So Ordered Stipulation, Agreement and Order Signed on 1/12/2010 Resolving the Debtors' Objection to proofs of Claim Filed by Home Box Office, Inc. (Porter, Marguerite) (Entered: 01/12/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1852 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Brittany Whalen of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 1850 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 01/07/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1851 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Brittany Whalen of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 1849 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 01/06/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1850 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Presentment of Stipulation, Agreement and Order Resolving the Debtors' Objection to Proofs of Claim Filed by Home Box Office, Inc. filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. with presentment to be held on 1/12/2010 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 617 (ALG) Objections due by 1/12/2010, (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 01/05/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1849 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Matrix / Notice of Filing of Updated Master Service List filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 01/04/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1716 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1700 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1699 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1698 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1697 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1696 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1695 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1694 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1693 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1692 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1691 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1690 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1689 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1688 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1687 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1686 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1685 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1684 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1683 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1682 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1681 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1680 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1679 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1678 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1677 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1676 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1675 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1674 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1673 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1672 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1671 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1670 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1669 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1668 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1667 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1666 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1665 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1664 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1663 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1662 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1661 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1660 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1659 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1658 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1657 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1656 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1655 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1654 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1653 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1652 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1651 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1650 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1617 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1583 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1474 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1325 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1324 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1320 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1267 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1262 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1251 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
|
 |
|
|
1242 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1241 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1237 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1229 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1220 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1219 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1216 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1194 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1168 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
947 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
946 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
691 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
666 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
663 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
|
 |
|
|
629 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
628 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
|
 |
|
|
461 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
400 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
399 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
398 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
397 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
396 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
395 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
394 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
393 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
392 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
391 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
390 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
389 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
388 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
387 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
386 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
385 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
384 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
383 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
382 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
381 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
380 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
379 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
378 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
377 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
376 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
375 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
374 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
373 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
372 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
371 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
370 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
369 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
368 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
367 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
366 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
365 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
364 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
363 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
362 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
361 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
360 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
359 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
358 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
357 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
356 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
355 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
354 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
353 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
352 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
351 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
350 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
294 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
|
 |
|
|
293 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
39 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
|
 |
|
|
38 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
|
 |
|
|
37 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
33 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
So Ordered Stipulation signed on 10/25/2010 Extending Time to Move, Answer or Otherwise Respond to Trustee's Complaint and Continuance of Pre-Trial Conference. (Saenz De Viteri, Monica) (Entered: 10/25/2010)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
32 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
31 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
30 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
|
 |
|
|
27 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement in Nature of Fee Application in Support of Proof of Claim of VIII SV5556 Lender, LLC (related document(s) 23 ) filed by Richard B. Levin on behalf of VIII SV5556 Lender, LLC. (Levin, Richard) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
25 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
|
 |
|
|
24 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
|
 |
|
|
23 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
|
 |
|
|
21 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
|
 |
|
|
19 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
|
 |
|
|
17 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
|
 |
|
|
16 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
|
 |
|
|
14 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
|
 |
|
|
12 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Konstantina Haidopoulos (related document(s) 11 ) filed by James H.M. Sprayregen on behalf of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC. (Sprayregen, James) (Entered: 01/27/2011)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
11 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
|
 |
|
|
10 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
9 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
8 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
|
 |
|
|
6 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
5 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |