Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff, Plaintiff
Walker Truesdell Roth & Associates, Plaintiff Officially listed as "Walker, Truesdell, Roth & Associates, as Trustee for and on behalf of the Extended Stay Litigation Trust"
Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Defendant Officially listed as "Credit Suisse Securities US, a/k/a Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC (as defined and named herein)"
Transfer Agreement FRBP. Corrected Partial Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security for Court Claim 6312-1 Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors: Goldman Sachs Lending Partners LLC (Claim No. 6312) To HCN LP (related document(s)13397) filed by Ned S. Schodek on behalf of HCN LP. (Schodek, Ned) (Entered: 03/14/2016)
Transfer Agreement FRBP. /Partial Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors: Compass Offshore HTV PCC Limited (Claim No. 6314, Amount $1,354,900.00) To Goldman Sachs Lending Partners LLC filed by Sean A. O'Neal on behalf of Goldman Sachs Lending Partners LLC. (O'Neal, Sean) (Entered: 03/14/2016)
Transfer Agreement FRBP. /Partial Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors: Compass Offshore HTV PCC Limited (Claim No. 6314, Amount $797,000.00) To Goldman Sachs Lending Partners LLC filed by Sean A. O'Neal on behalf of Goldman Sachs Lending Partners LLC. (O'Neal, Sean) (Entered: 03/14/2016)
Transfer Agreement FRBP. /Partial Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors: Compass Offshore HTV PCC Limited (Claim No. 6314, Amount $398,500.00) To Goldman Sachs Lending Partners LLC filed by Sean A. O'Neal on behalf of Goldman Sachs Lending Partners LLC. (O'Neal, Sean) (Entered: 03/14/2016)
Transfer Agreement FRBP. /Partial Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors: Compass HTV LLC (Claim No. 6314, Amount $2,017,900.00) To Goldman Sachs Lending Partners LLC filed by Sean A. O'Neal on behalf of Goldman Sachs Lending Partners LLC. (O'Neal, Sean) (Entered: 03/14/2016)
Transfer Agreement FRBP. /Partial Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors: Compass HTV LLC (Claim No. 6314, Amount $593,500.00) To Goldman Sachs Lending Partners LLC filed by Sean A. O'Neal on behalf of Goldman Sachs Lending Partners LLC. (O'Neal, Sean) (Entered: 03/14/2016)
Transfer Agreement FRBP. /Partial Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors: Compass HTV LLC (Claim No. 6314, Amount $1,187,000.00) To Goldman Sachs Lending Partners LLC filed by Sean A. O'Neal on behalf of Goldman Sachs Lending Partners LLC. (O'Neal, Sean) (Entered: 03/14/2016)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:The Royal Bank of Scotland plc(Claim No.59557, Amount 1,209,000.00). To Davidson Kempner Partners. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Davidson Kempner Partners.(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:The Royal Bank of Scotland plc(Claim No.59557, Amount 1,789,000.00). To Davidson Kempner Institutional Partners L.P.. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Davidson Kempner Institutional Partners, L.P..(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:The Royal Bank of Scotland plc(Claim No.59557, Amount 1,380,000.00). To Davidson Kempner International Limited. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Davidson Kempner International, Ltd..(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:The Royal Bank of Scotland plc(Claim No.59557, Amount 418,000.00). To Davidson Kempner Distressed Opportunities Internat. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Davidson Kempner Distressed Opportunities International Ltd..(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:The Royal Bank of Scotland plc(Claim No.59557, Amount 6,000.00). To M.H. Davidson & Co.. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of M.H. Davidson & Co..(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:The Royal Bank of Scotland plc(Claim No.59557, Amount 198,000.00). To Davidson Kempner Distressed Opportunities Fund LP. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Davidson Kempner Distressed Opportunities Fund LP.(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:UBS AG(Claim No.59233, Amount 17,150,000.00). To Goldman, Sachs & Co.. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Goldman, Sachs & Co..(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:UBS AG(Claim No.59233, Amount 2,700,000.00). To Goldman, Sachs & Co.. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Goldman, Sachs & Co..(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
Notice of Appearance With Certificate of Service filed by Jennifer V. Doran on behalf of Citibank, N.A. Agency & Trust. (Doran, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission With Certificate of Service filed by Jennifer V. Doran on behalf of Citibank, N.A. Agency & Trust. (Doran, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Wembley National Stadium Limited(Claim No.43791, Amount 620,620.00). To HBK Master Fund L.P.. filed by John R. Smith Jr. on behalf of HBK Master Fund L.P..(Smith, John) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
Affidavit / Tenth Supplemental Affidavit of Robert Jay Moore in Connection with Retention and Employment of Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP as Counsel to Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (related document(s) 4474 , 1165 , 3700 , 16909 , 7648 , 6360 , 9237 , 12609 , 2709 , 1500 ) filed by Risa M. Rosenberg on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Rosenberg, Risa) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 1 Transferors:Citibank, N.A.(Claim No.55393, Amount 400,000). To J.P. Morgan Securities LLC. filed by Howard J. Grossman on behalf of J.P. Morgan Securities LLC.(Grossman, Howard) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer of Claim Other Than For Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Societe Generale Bank & Trust(Claim No.62901, Amount 2,696,850.00). To Illiquidx LLP. filed by James N. Truitt on behalf of Illiquidx LLP.(Truitt, James) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
Notice of Presentment of Supplemental Order Pursuant to Section 105(a) of the Bankruptcy Code and General Order M-390 for Authorization to Implement Alternative Dispute Resolution Procedures for Affirmative Claims of Debtors Under Derivatives Transactions with Special Purpose Vehicle Counterparties filed by Richard W. Slack on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with presentment to be held on 11/9/2011 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Objections due by 11/8/2011, (Slack, Richard) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
Statement / Supplemental Disclosure with Respect to Motion of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. and Lehman Commercial Paper Inc. Pursuant to Section 363 of the Bankruptcy Code for Authority to Sell Interest in Rosslyn Syndication Partners JV LP (related document(s) 19316 , 18794 ) filed by Alfredo R. Perez on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Perez, Alfredo) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
Notice of Proposed Order / Notice of Revised Proposed Order Granting Debtors' Motion Pursuant to Section 362 of the Bankruptcy Code for an Order Modifying the Automatic Stay to Allow Settlement Payment Under the 2007-2008 Directors and Officers Insurance Policies by the Excess Policy Insurers (related document(s) 21299 ) filed by Richard P. Krasnow on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/16/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Krasnow, Richard) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
Notice of Proposed Order / Notice of Revised Proposed Order Granting Debtors' Motion Pursuant to Section 362 of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rule 4001 for an Order Modifying the Automatic Stay to Allow Settlement Payment Under Directors and Officers Insurance Policies (related document(s) 20849 ) filed by Richard P. Krasnow on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/16/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Krasnow, Richard) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
Affidavit of Service Supplemental Affidavit of Service of Objection to Confirmation of Plan as to LBHI and LCPI to the Extent it Fails to Properly Classify and Treat Deutsche Bank AG Claims and Renewed Motion to Treat Such Claims Like and Equal to General Unsecured Claims Against LBHI and LCPI as Required by Court Approved Settlement (related document(s) 21416 ) filed by Alan Kolod on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG. (Kolod, Alan) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 1 Transferors:J.P. Morgan Securities Ltd.(Claim No.58074, Amount 10,000,000.00). To JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. filed by Howard J. Grossman on behalf of JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A..(Grossman, Howard) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Notice of Transfer of Claim Pursuant to Rule 3001(e)(2) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Morgan Stanley & Co. International PLC(Claim No. 55741). To Baupost Group Securities, L.L.C.. filed by Philip Anthony Wells on behalf of Baupost Group Securities, L.L.C..(Wells, Philip) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Lauren Rodriguez of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 20492 , 20739 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Dell Global B.V. (Singapore Branch)(Claim No.12920, Amount 25,400,000). To Merrill Lynch Credit Products, LLC. filed by Thomas T. Janover on behalf of Merrill Lynch Credit Products, LLC.(Janover, Thomas) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Dell Global B.V. (Singapore Branch)(Claim No.12919, Amount 25,400,000). To Merrill Lynch Credit Products, LLC. filed by Thomas T. Janover on behalf of Merrill Lynch Credit Products, LLC.(Janover, Thomas) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Kossivas of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 20956 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Kossivas of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 20936 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
Motion to Authorize : Joint Motion of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. and James W. Giddens, as Trustee for Lehman Brothers Inc., Pursuant to Sections 105(a) and 363 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 9019 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure (i) for Authorization and Approval of a Stock Purchase Agreement Regarding the VEBA and (ii) for Authorization and Approval of a Settlement Regarding the Same filed by Richard P. Krasnow on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/16/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Responses due by 11/9/2011, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B (Part 1 of 2)# 3 Exhibit B (Part 2 of 2)# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Exhibit E) (Krasnow, Richard) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Debtors' One Hundred and Eighty Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claims (Misclassified Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/30/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Debtors' One Hundred and Eighty Sixth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Misclassified Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/30/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 21098 ) filed by Lawrence Evan Jacobs on behalf of Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP. (Jacobs, Lawrence) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' Two Hundred Fourth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Derivatives Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/30/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Kossivas of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 20946 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Morgan Stanley Capital Group(Claim No. 20527). To Baupost Group Securities, L.L.C.. filed by Philip Anthony Wells on behalf of Baupost Group Securities, L.L.C..(Wells, Philip) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Morgan Stanley Capital Group Inc.(Claim No. 20526). To Baupost Group Securities, L.L.C.. filed by Philip Anthony Wells on behalf of Baupost Group Securities, L.L.C..(Wells, Philip) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Kossivas of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 20955 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Kossivas of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 20977 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
Letter Re Rule 1.12 of New York Rules of Professional Conduct filed by Lawrence Evan Jacobs on behalf of Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP. (Jacobs, Lawrence) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 20926 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Malo, David) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on Debtors Objection to Proof of Claim No. 66099 Filed by Syncora Guarantee, Inc. (related document(s) 20087 ) filed by Michael A. Rollin on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/30/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Rollin, Michael) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on Debtors Two Hundred Ninth Omnibus Objection to Portions of Claim Nos. 29883 and 29879 filed by Citibank, N.A. and Citigroup Global Markets, Inc. (related document(s) 20030 ) filed by Michael A. Rollin on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/30/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Rollin, Michael) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on Debtors Objection to Proof of Claim No. 23713 Filed by PHH Mortgage Corporation (related document(s) 20080 ) filed by Michael A. Rollin on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/30/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Rollin, Michael) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on Debtors Ninety-Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claims (Insufficient Documentation) (related document(s) 14492 ) filed by Michael A. Rollin on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/30/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Rollin, Michael) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on Debtors One Hundred Twenty Fifth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Insufficient Documentation) (related document(s) 16079 ) filed by Michael A. Rollin on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/30/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Rollin, Michael) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Goldman Sachs Lending Partners LLP(Claim No.66415, Amount 5,700,000.00); Goldman Sachs Lending Partners LLP(Claim No.66414, Amount 5,700,000.00). To HBK Master Fund L.P.. filed by John R. Smith Jr. on behalf of HBK Master Fund L.P..(Smith, John) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
Statement of No Objection CERTIFICATE OF NO OBJECTION UNDER 28 U.S.C. § 1746 REGARDING MOTION OF INTERNATIONAL FINANCE CORPORATION PURSUANT TO RULE 3018(a) OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF BANKRUPTCY PROCEDURE FOR TEMPORARY ALLOWANCE OF CLAIMS FOR VOTING PURPOSES filed by James I. McClammy on behalf of INTERNATIONAL FINANCE CORPORATION. (McClammy, James) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
Statement of No Objection CERTIFICATE OF NO OBJECTION UNDER 28 U.S.C. § 1746 REGARDING MOTION OF INTERNATIONAL BANK FOR RECONSTRUCTION AND DEVELOPMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 3018(a) OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF BANKRUPTCY PROCEDURE FOR TEMPORARY ALLOWANCE OF CLAIMS FOR VOTING PURPOSES filed by James I. McClammy on behalf of International Bank for Reconstruction and Development. (McClammy, James) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' One Hundred Eighteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims (To Reclassify Proofs of Claim as Equity Interests) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 12/21/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
Opposition to Debtors' Two Hundred Fourteenth Omnibus Objection to Disallow And Expunge Certain Filed Proofs of Claim (related document(s) 20103 ) filed by Eduardo Rafael Schiariti. (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 20924 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
Opposition to Debtors' Two Hundred and Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claims (To Reclassify Proofs of Claim as Equity Interests), In re: Claim No. 7163 [See Second Page] (related document(s) 20012 ) filed by Winsome McDonald. (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
Certificate of Service (related document(s) 18478 ) filed by Brian Trust on behalf of Swift Master Auto Receivables Trust. (Trust, Brian) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Third Application for Interim Professional Compensation for SNR Denton US LLP, Special Counsel, period: 2/1/2011 to 5/31/2011, fee:$725,112.50, expenses: $1,481.27. filed by SNR Denton US LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D - Part 1# 5 Exhibit D - Part 2# 6 Exhibit D - Part 3# 7 Exhibit D - Part 4# 8 Proposed Order) (McDonald, Hugh) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 18447 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC Claims Agent.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 18445 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC Claims Agent.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Statement of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors In Support of the Debtors' Motion Pursuant to Section 363 of the Bankruptcy Code and Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019 for Authority to (I) Enter into the Second Amended Joint Chapter 11 Plan Proposed by the Lehman Creditors and the Suncal Trustee on Behalf of the Suncal Involuntary Debtors in Eight of the Suncal Involuntary Debtors Cases; (II) Enter into the Second Amended Joint Chapter 11 Plan Proposed by the Lehman Lenders in Eleven of the Suncal Voluntary Debtors' Cases; and (III) Participate in any Auction of the Suncal Debtors' Assets (related document(s) 18122 ) filed by Dennis F. Dunne on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Dunne, Dennis) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:DEUTSCHE BANK AG, LONDON BRANCH(Claim No.66799, Amount 10,000,000.00); DEUTSCHE BANK AG, LONDON BRANCH(Claim No.66800, Amount 10,000,000.00). To HBK MASTER FUND L.P.. filed by John R. Smith Jr. on behalf of HBK Master Fund L.P..(Smith, John) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:DEUTSCHE BANK AG, LONDON BRANCH(Claim No.67311, Amount 10,000,000.00); DEUTSCHE BANK AG, LONDON BRANCH(Claim No.67312, Amount 10,000,000.00). To HBK Master Fund L.P.. filed by John R. Smith Jr. on behalf of HBK Master Fund L.P..(Smith, John) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Statement of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors In Support of Debtors' Objection to Motion of Merrill Lynch Portfolio Management, Inc. and Merrill Lynch Capital Services, Inc. for Entry of an Order Compelling Specific Performance of Subordination Agreement Terms (related document(s) 18033 , 18486 ) filed by Dennis F. Dunne on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Dunne, Dennis) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Certificate of Service (related document(s) 18567 ) filed by Thomas John Wright on behalf of Giants Stadium LLC. (Wright, Thomas) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Partial Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Banca di Credito Cooperativo di Alba, Langhe(Claim No.48659, Amount 375,001.50). To Cassa di Risparmio di Bra S.p.A.. filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing : Notice of Adjournment of the Hearing on the Motion of Giants Stadium LLC for Leave to Conduct Discovery of the Debtors Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 2004 (related document(s) 16016 ) filed by Bruce E. Clark on behalf of Giants Stadium LLC. with hearing to be held on 8/17/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Clark, Bruce) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Partial Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Banca di Credito Cooperativo di Alba, Langhe(Claim No.48659, Amount 141,510.00). To Cassa di Risparmio di Bra S.p.A.. filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Dagmara Krasa-Berstell (related document(s) 18533 , 18559 , 18534 ) filed by Philip Dublin on behalf of Centerbridge Credit Advisors LLC. (Dublin, Philip) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' Objection to Certain Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) as to Investcorp Interlachen Multi-Strategy Master Fund Ltd filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 8/25/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' Thirty-Fifth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 8/25/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' Sixty-Third Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 8/25/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Certificate of Service (related document(s) 18531 ) filed by Carollynn H.G. Callari on behalf of Danske Bank A/S, London Branch. (Callari, Carollynn) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Response to Motion - Joinder Supporting Response of Centerbridge Credit Advisors LLC to Debtors' Motion for (i) Approval of Stipulation and Order Regarding Chapter 11 Plans and (ii) Stay of Related Discovery (related document(s) 18306 ) filed by Brent C. Strickland on behalf of Monarch Alternative Capital LP. (Strickland, Brent) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Affidavit of David Duclos in Connection with the Motion Pursuant to Sections 105(a) and 365 of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rules 6006, 9014, and 9019 for Authorization to Terminate and Settle or Reject Certain Prepetition Derivatives Contracts with Trusts for which U.S. Bank National Association Serves as Indenture Trustee and Related Relief (related document(s) 18106 ) filed by Ann E. Acker on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B# 2 Exhibit C) (Acker, Ann) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' Sixty-Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 8/25/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' Objection to Certain Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) as to Merrill Lynch Credit Products, LLC filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 10/27/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' Seventy-First Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 8/25/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Declaration of Michael Trickey in Support of the Motion Pursuant to Section 105(a) of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rule 9019 for Approval of the Termination and Settlement of Certain Prepetition Derivatives Contracts with Trusts for which U.S. Bank National Association Serves as Indenture Trustee and Related Relief (related document(s) 18106 ) filed by Ann E. Acker on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association. (Acker, Ann) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' Eighty-Fourth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 8/25/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' Ninety-Fifth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 8/25/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' One Hundred Third Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 8/25/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' One Hundred Thirty-Second Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 8/25/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' One Hundred Thirty-Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 8/25/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' One Hundred Fifty-Fifth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 8/25/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Notice Of Partial Transfer Of Claim Other Than For Security, Pursuant To Fed. R. Bankr. P. 3001(e)(2) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Merrill Lynch Credit Products, LLC(Claim No.16062, Amount 3,609,920.20). To SPCP Group, LLC. filed by Tina N. Moss on behalf of SPCP Group L.L.C..(Moss, Tina) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Notice Of Partial Transfer Of Claim Other Than For Security, Pursuant To Fed. R. Bankr. P. 3001(e)(2) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Merrill Lynch Credit Products, LLC(Claim No.16062, Amount 3,619,825.90). To SPCP Group, LLC. filed by Tina N. Moss on behalf of SPCP Group L.L.C..(Moss, Tina) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Notice Of Partial Transfer Of Claim Other Than For Security, Pursuant To Fed. R. Bankr. P. 3001(e)(2) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Merrill Lynch Credit Products, LLC(Claim No.16062, Amount 7,339,131.91). To SPCP Group, LLC. filed by Tina N. Moss on behalf of SPCP Group L.L.C..(Moss, Tina) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Bank Julius Baer & Co.(Claim No.55829, Amount 875,000.00). To JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. filed by Howard J. Grossman on behalf of JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A..(Grossman, Howard) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Motion to Approve : Debtors' Motion Pursuant to Section 105(a) of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rule 9019 for Approval of a Settlement and Compromise Among Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc., Lehman Commercial Paper Inc., and State Street Bank and Trust Company filed by Jacqueline Marcus on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 8/17/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Responses due by 8/10/2011, (Marcus, Jacqueline) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Order signed on 7/15/2011 Denying Motion of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc., et al., Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 105(a), Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(b), and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9024, for Relief From Order Under 11 U.S.C. Sections 105(a), 363, and 365 and Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure 2002, 6004 and 6006 Authorizing and Approving (A) Sale of Purchased Assets Free and Clear of Liens and Other Interests and (B) Assumption and Assignment of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases, Dated September 20, 2008 (and Related SIPA Sale Order). (Related Doc # 5169 ) (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Bank Leumi le-Israel B.M.(Claim No.64025, Amount 100,000,000.00). To Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch. filed by Jeffrey M. Olinsky on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch.(Olinsky, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Order signed on 7/15/2011 Denying Motion for an Order, Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60 and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9024, Modifying the September 20, 2008 Sale Order and Granting Other Relief. (Related Doc # 5148 ) (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on Motion of the Ad Hoc Group of Lehman Brothers Creditors Pursuant to Sections 105(a) and 1109(b) of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rules 2019 and 7026 to Establish Disclosure Procedures (related document(s) 17014 ) filed by Gerard Uzzi on behalf of Ad Hoc Group of Lehman Brothers Creditors. with hearing to be held on 8/17/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Uzzi, Gerard) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Application of the Debtors Pursuant to Section 327(e) of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 2014 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure for Authorization to Expand the Scope of their Retention of Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP as Special Counsel, Nunc Pro Tunc to September 18, 2009 filed by Richard P. Krasnow on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 8/17/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Krasnow, Richard) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 18444 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC Claims Agent.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Reply to Motion /Reply of Evangelical Christian Credit Union to Lehman Commercial Paper Inc.'s Response to Motion for Relief from the Automatic Stay (related document(s) 16259 ) filed by Blanka K. Wolfe on behalf of Evangelical Christian Credit Union. (Wolfe, Blanka) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Response to Motion Joinder to Response of Centerbridge Credit Advisors LLC [Docket Entry # 18533] to the Debtors Motion for (i) Approval of Stipulation and Order Regarding Chapter 11 Plans and (ii) Stay of Related Discovery (related document(s) 18306 ) filed by Jessica Fainman on behalf of Anchorage Capital Group, L.L.C.. (Fainman, Jessica) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Response of Centerbridge Credit Advisors LLC to Debtors` Motion for (i) Approval of Stipulation and Order Regarding Chapter 11 Plans and (ii) Stay of Related Discovery (related document(s) 18306 ) filed by Philip Dublin on behalf of Centerbridge Credit Advisors LLC. (Dublin, Philip) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Objection to Motion -- Limited Objection to Debtors' Motion for (i) Approval Stipulation and Order Regarding Chapter 11 Plans and (ii) Stay of Related Discovery (related document(s) 18306 ) filed by Michael A. Rosenthal on behalf of PricewaterhouseCoopers AG, Zurich. with hearing to be held on 7/20/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Rosenthal, Michael) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Response to Motion Response of Danske Bank A/S, London Branch to Debtors Motion for (i) Approval of Stipulation and Order Regarding Chapter 11 Plans and (ii) Stay of Related Discovery (related document(s) 18306 ) filed by Carollynn H.G. Callari on behalf of Danske Bank A/S, London Branch. (Callari, Carollynn) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 18494 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 18497 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Post-Confirmation Report. /Debtors' Post-Confirmation Quarterly Report For The Period From April 1, 2011 To June 30, 2011 filed by Anna Boelitz on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Boelitz, Anna) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Withdrawal of Claim(s): filed on April 14, 2008 in the amount of $123,395.49 filed by Illinois Department of Revenue Bankruptcy Administration.(Gadson, Carol) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
Notice of Presentment NOTICE OF PRESENTMENT OF THE REORGANIZED DEBTORS SIXTEENTH OMNIBUS APPLICATION SEEKING TO ALLOW PERMITTED SETTLEMENTS filed by Anthony D. Boccanfuso on behalf of Quebecor World (USA) Inc.. with presentment to be held on 7/25/2011 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Objections due by 7/25/2011, (Boccanfuso, Anthony) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Response to Motion by Trustee for Entry of an Order Establishing Notice Procedures and Objection in Part. (related document(s) 4469 ) filed by Richard A. Cirillo on behalf of The Pascucci Family, Korea Exchange Bank, Kookmin Bank, Lemania SICAV-SIF, NBK Banque Privee (Suisse) SA, National Bank of Kuwait, S.A.K.. (Cirillo, Richard) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
Application to Employ Browne Jacobson LLP as Special Counsel / Trustee's Motion for an Order Approving the Retention of Browne Jacobson LLP as Special Counsel Nunc Pro Tunc as of October 27, 2011 filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard. Responses due by 11/9/2011, with presentment to be held on 11/9/2011 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Presentment# 2 Exhibit A Declaration of Disinterestedness# 3 Exhibit B Proposed Order) (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance and Request for Removal from Service Lists (related document(s) 880 ) filed by Janice Beth Grubin on behalf of ABG Partners d/b/a ABG Investments, Bruce Graybow, Graybow Communications Group, Inc.. (Grubin, Janice) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
Certificate of Service (related document(s) 4221 ) filed by Jessica L Margolis on behalf of The John E. Guinness Revocable Trust Dated June 11, 1992. (Margolis, Jessica) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Affidavit of Service re Motion to Assume Leases or Executory Contracts /Debtors' Fifth Omnibus Motion Pursuant to Sections 363(b) and 365(a) of the Bankruptcy Code Authorizing the Debtors to Assume Certain Unexpired Leases and Related Subleases of Non-Residential Real Property (related document(s) 2780 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
Affidavit of Service re Order signed on 10/24/2011 Granting Debtors' Fourth Omnibus Motion Pursuant to Sections 363(b) and 365(a) of the Bankruptcy Code Authorizing the Debtors to Assume Certain Unexpired Leases and Related Subleases of Non-Residential Real Property (related document(s) 2753 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
Monthly Fee Statement of Kirkland & Ellis LLP for Compensation for Professional Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred as Attorneys for the Debtors and Debtors in Possession for the Period from September 1, 2011 through September 30, 2011 (related document(s) 505 ) filed by Paul M. Basta on behalf of The Great Atlantic & Pacific Tea Company, Inc.. (Basta, Paul) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses With Notice of Motion. filed by Timothy D. Kline. with hearing to be held on 12/15/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom TBA, White Plains Office Responses due by 12/8/2011, (Kline, Timothy) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
Order Signed on 11/1/2011 Granting Application of Ivonne Tolentino for Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice (Related Doc # 2775 ). (Li, Dorothy) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Kimberley R. Cameron of Brown Rudnick LLP (related document(s) 2778 ) filed by Edward S. Weisfelner on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as Successor Trustee and Collateral Agent for the Senior Secured Notes Due 2015. (Weisfelner, Edward) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
Motion for Relief from Stay under Section 362 of the Bankruptcy Code filed by Kelly M. Purcaro on behalf of James Heath. with hearing to be held on 11/14/2011 (check with court for location) (Purcaro, Kelly) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
Certificate of Service of Lisa Marie Bonito re: service of Motion of Michaels Stores, Inc. for Order Directing Waldbaum, Inc. to Return Funds Improperly Paid to It (related document(s) 2723 ) filed by Samuel Jason Teele on behalf of Michaels Stores, Inc.. (Teele, Samuel) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
Order signed on 10/21/2011 Authorizing and Approving the Debtors' (A) Issuance of a Replacment Letter of Credit and (B) Granting Related Relief (Related Doc # 2714 ). (Correa, Mimi) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Charmaine Thomas (related document(s) 2739 ) filed by Michael Earl Comerford on behalf of FTI Consulting, Inc.. (Comerford, Michael) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
Certificate of Service (related document(s) 2746 ) filed by Jason W. Bank on behalf of Kerr, Russell and Weber, PLC. (Bank, Jason) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
Declaration of Disinterestedness (related document(s) 506 ) filed by Jason W. Bank on behalf of Kerr, Russell and Weber, PLC. (Bank, Jason) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
Motion to File Proof of Claim After Claims Bar Date and Accept as Timely File Proof of Claim of Maria Castrejon Against Pathmark Stores, Inc. filed by Pamela A. Stampp on behalf of Maria Castrejon. with hearing to be held on 11/14/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 118, White Plains Office (Correa, Mimi) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 1 Transferors:Moody Dunbar, Inc.(Claim No.3966, Amount 19,846.40). To JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA. filed by Howard J. Grossman on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Grossman, Howard) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on November 3, 2011 At 10:00 A.M. filed by James T. Grogan on behalf of FairPoint Communications, Inc.. (Grogan, James) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
Matrix / Notice of Filing of Master Service List as of November 1, 2011 filed by Martin Sosland on behalf of BB Liquidating Inc.. (Sosland, Martin) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
Certificate of Service for MRI Contract Staffing, Inc. (related document(s) 2251 ) filed by Warren S. Wolf on behalf of Warren Wolf. (Wolf, Warren) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
Notice of Motion to Set Hearing for MRI, Contract Staffing, Inc. (related document(s) 2251 ) filed by Warren S. Wolf on behalf of Warren Wolf. with hearing to be held on 11/22/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) (Wolf, Warren) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
Certificate of Service as to Objection to proposed stipulation and order authorizing debtors to reject the unexpired lease of non-residential real property between A&P and 380 Downing Drive, LLC (related document(s) 2216 ) filed by Nathan Schwed on behalf of 380 Yorktown Food Corp.. (Schwed, Nathan) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on June 23, 2011 2:33 PM RE: Debors' Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to (A) Enter into a Replacement Supply and Logistics Contract and (B) Reject Existing Warehousing, Distribution, and Related Services Agreement and (II) Approving Comprehensive (# 1761 ); Declaration of Marie Robinson in Support of Debtors' Motion (# 1817 ). Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 9/26/2011. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Reporting Company.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 7/5/2011. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 7/18/2011. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 7/28/2011. Transcript access will be restricted through 9/26/2011. (Richards, Beverly) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Motion to File Proof of Claim After Claims Bar Date filed by Kenyatta Stewart on behalf of Paula McCoy-Franklin. with hearing to be held on 8/16/2011 at 10:00 AM at Location to be announced (Chou, Rosalyn) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Christopher J. Pogan on behalf of Kenneth Halvorsen. with hearing to be held on 8/16/2011 at 10:00 AM at Location to be announced Filing fee collected, receipt #187186. (Attachments: # 1 affirmation# 2 affidavit of service# 3 Proposed order) (Chou, Rosalyn) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Affidavit of Service re Second Quarterly Fee Statement of Alvarez & Marsal North America, LLC in Their Capacity as Chief Restructuring Officer, for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred for the Period February 1, 2011 Through April 30, 2011 (related document(s) 2027 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Statement / Notice of Rejection of Unexpired Lease (related document(s) 362 ) filed by Martin Sosland on behalf of Blockbuster Inc.. (Sosland, Martin) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Certificate of Service (related document(s) 2036 , 2054 ) filed by Alan D. Halperin on behalf of Donahue Schriber Realty Group, LP, Glimcher Properties Limited Partnership. (Halperin, Alan) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Leslie A. Cohen filed by Mark S. Lichtenstein on behalf of Deusenberg-Topanga. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Lichtenstein, Mark) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Certificate of Service (related document(s) 2056 ) filed by Mark S. Lichtenstein on behalf of Deusenberg-Topanga. (Lichtenstein, Mark) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Objection to Motion Objection to Debtors' Notice of (I) Fifth Supplemental PAC Designation and (II) Objection Deadline to Proposed Assumption and Assignment of Unexpired Nonresidential Real Property Leases to Purchaser or an Affiliate Thereof (related document(s) 1989) filed by Mark S. Lichtenstein on behalf of Deusenberg-Topanga. with hearing to be held on 7/19/2011 (check with court for location) (Attachments: # 1 Ex. 1) (Lichtenstein, Mark) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Objection of Certain Landlords to the Notice of (I) Fifth Supplemental PAC Designation and (Ii) Objection Deadline to Proposed Assumption and Assignment of Unexpired Nonresidential Real Property Leases to Purchaser or an Affiliate Thereof (related document(s) 1989 ) filed by William Novotny on behalf of State Line OPCO LLC, WFC Fund I Legacy OPCO LLC, OT Texas Greenville, LP, OT Chatsworth Texas, LP, OT 12900 Victory Company, LP, OT Laurel Texas, LP, Cypress Corteen, LP. (Novotny, William) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Objection Objection of Glimcher Properties Limited Partnership to Notice of Fifth Supplemental PAC Designation and Proposed Assumption and Assignment of Lease (related document(s) 1989 ) filed by Christopher J. Battaglia on behalf of Glimcher Properties Limited Partnership. with hearing to be held on 7/19/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B) (Battaglia, Christopher) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Objection / OBJECTION OF SAFEWAY INC. TO THE NOTICE OF (I) FIFTH SUPPLEMENTAL PAC DESIGNATION AND (II) OBJECTION DEADLINE TO PROPOSED ASSUMPTION AND ASSIGNMENT OF UNEXPIRED NONRESIDENTIAL REAL PROPERTY LEASES TO PURCHASER OR AN AFFILIATE THEREOF (related document(s) 1989 ) filed by Stephen Z. Starr on behalf of Safeway Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B) (Starr, Stephen) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Objection to Proposed Assumption and Assignment of Unexpired Real Estate Leases (related document(s) 1989 ) filed by Robert L. LeHane on behalf of Aston Properties, Benderson Development Company, Inc., Developers Diversified Realty Corporation, GKGF, LLC, Regency Centers Corporation, Weingarten Realty Investors. (LeHane, Robert) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Objection / OBJECTION OF SAFEWAY INC. TO THE NOTICE OF (I) FIFTH SUPPLEMENTAL PAC DESIGNATION AND (II) OBJECTION DEADLINE TO PROPOSED ASSUMPTION AND ASSIGNMENT OF UNEXPIRED NONRESIDENTIAL REAL PROPERTY LEASES TO PURCHASER OR AN AFFILIATE THEREOF (related document(s) 1989 ) filed by Stephen Z. Starr on behalf of Safeway Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B) (Starr, Stephen) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Objection Objection of Centro Apollo I TX LP and Centro Heritage SPE 4 LLC to Debtors' (I) Motion, Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 105, 363, 364, and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2002, 4001, 6004, 6006, 9008, and 9014, for Entry of: (I) an Order Approving (A) Bid Procedures, (B) Stalking Horse Expense Reimbursement, (C) Notice of Sale, Auction, and Sale Hearing, (D) Assumption Procedures and Related Notices, (E) Incurrence of Sale-Related Administrative Priority Claims, and (F) Imposition of an Administrative Stay; and (II) Notice of (A) Fifth Supplemental PAC Designation and (B) Objection Deadline to Proposed Assumption and Assignment of Unexpired Nonresidential Real Property Leases to Purchaser or an Affiliate Thereof filed by David L. Pollack on behalf of Centro Apollo I TX LP and Centro Heritage SPE 4 LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B# 2 Certificate of Service) (Pollack, David) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Objection SUPPLEMENTAL CURE OBJECTION OF WATT MANAGEMENT COMPANY, WEST VALLEY PROPERTIES, INC., JONES LANG LASALLE AMERICAS, INC., SEC COMMERCIAL REALTY GROUP, INC., AND SOUTHGATE MALL ASSOCIATES, L.P. TO THE NOTICE OF (I) FIFTH SUPPLEMENTAL PAC DESIGNATION AND (II) OBJECTION DEADLINE TO PROPOSED ASSUMPTION AND ASSIGNMENT OF UNEXPIRED NONRESIDENTIAL REAL PROPERTY LEASES TO PURCHASER OR AN AFFILIATE THEREOF filed by James N. Truitt on behalf of Watt Management Company. with hearing to be held on 7/19/2011 (check with court for location) Objections due by 7/15/2011, (Truitt, James) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Objection to Motion : Limited Objection to Debtors' Notice of (I) Fifth Supplemental PAC Designation and (II) Objection Deadline to Proposed Assumption and Assignment of Unexpired Nonresidential Real Property Leases to Purchaser or an Affiliate Thereof filed by Shawn Randall Fox on behalf of U.S. REIF/MJW Waimea Fee, LLC. (Fox, Shawn) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Objection (Limited) of the Kimco Landlords to Debtors (I) Fifth Supplemental Pac Designation and (II) Objection Deadline to Proposed Assumption and Assignment of Unexpired Nonresidential Real Property Leases to Purchaser or an Affiliate Thereof (related document(s) 1989 ) filed by Neil E. Herman on behalf of Kimco Realty Corporation. (Herman, Neil) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Affidavit of Service / Supplemental Affidavit of Service re Notice of (I) Proposed Sale of All or Substantially All of the Debtors' Assets Free and Clear of All Lien, Claims and Encumbrances, (II) Bid Procedures, (III) Auction, and (IV) Sale Hearing (related document(s) 1223 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Affidavit of Service / Supplemental Affidavit of Service re Notice of Deadline for Filing Administrative Claims (related document(s) 1777 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Affidavit of Service / Supplemental Affidavit of Service re Notice of Deadline for Filing Administrative Claims (related document(s) 1777 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Objection to Motion Objection to Debtors' Designated Cure Amount filed by Steven W. Kelly on behalf of ADLP-M&H, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Objection to Debtors' Designated Cure Amount) (Kelly, Steven) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Objection of Main Street Station LLC to Notice of (I) Fifth Supplemental PAC Designation and (II) Objection Deadline to Proposed Assumption and Assignment of Unexpired Nonresidential Real Property Leases to Purchaser or an Affiliate Thereof (related document(s) 1989 ) filed by Julia Anne Karwowski on behalf of Main Street Station, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Karwowski, Julia Anne) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Objection to Notice of (I) Fifth Supplemental PAC Designation and (II) Objection Deadline to Proposed Assumption and Assignment of Unexpired Nonresidential Real Property Leases to Purchaser or an Affiliate Thereof (Docket No. 1911 ) filed by Christina M. Thompson on behalf of Inland Commercial Property Management, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 7/19/2011 (check with court for location) Objections due by 7/15/2011, (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Thompson, Christina) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Objection to Notice of (I) Fifth Supplemental PAC Designation and (II) Objection Deadline to Proposed Assumption and Assignment of Unexpired Nonresidential Real Property Leases to Purchaser or an Affiliate Thereof (Docket No. 1911 ) filed by Christina M. Thompson on behalf of Inland American Retail Management, LLC. with hearing to be held on 7/19/2011 (check with court for location) Objections due by 7/15/2011, (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Thompson, Christina) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission / Motion for Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Andrew J. Currie filed by Julia Anne Karwowski on behalf of Main Street Station, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Karwowski, Julia Anne) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Objection of Northpointe Plaza Limited Partnership to Notice of (I) Fifth Supplemental PAC Designation and (II) Objection to Deadline to Proposed Assumption and Assignment to Unexpired Nonresidential Real Property Leases to Purchaser or an Affiliate Thereof (related document(s) 1989 ) filed by David M. Blau on behalf of Northpointe Plaza Limited Partnership. (Blau, David) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Objection Supplemental Objection of Landlord Donahue Schriber Realty Group, LP to Proposed Cure Amounts (Fifth Supplemental PAC Designation) (related document(s) 1989 , 1349 ) filed by Christopher J. Battaglia on behalf of Donahue Schriber Realty Group, LP. with hearing to be held on 7/19/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A - E) (Battaglia, Christopher) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Notice of Withdrawal of James Chang, Esq. filed by David S. Elkind on behalf of Rovi Corporation, Rovi Data Solutions. (Elkind, David) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Objection Limited Objection of Centro Properties Group to Debtors' (I) Motion, Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 105, 363, 364, and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2002, 4001, 6004, 6006, 9008, and 9014, for Entry of: (I) an Order Approving (A) Bid Procedures, (B) Stalking Horse Expense Reimbursement, (C) Notice of Sale, Auction, and Sale Hearing, (D) Assumption Procedures and Related Notices, (E) Incurrence of Sale-Related Administrative Priority Claims, and (F) Imposition of an Administrative Stay; and (II) Notice of (A) Fifth Supplemental PAC Designation and (B) Objection Deadline to Proposed Assumption and Assignment of Unexpired Nonresidential Real Property Leases to Purchaser or an Affiliate Thereof filed by David L. Pollack on behalf of Centro Properties Group. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-H# 2 Certificate of Service) (Pollack, David) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Affidavit of Service re Documents served on or before July 14, 2011 (related document(s) 2004 , 2013 , 1899 , 2008 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Objection To Cure Amount By Prima II, LLC (Store No. 34149 - Hillsdale, NJ) filed by Anthony J Cichello on behalf of Prima II, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Cichello, Anthony) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Notice of Adjournment of Presentation of Certain Motions for Orders Directing the Examination of and Production of Documents (related document(s) 914 , 918 , 934 , 926 , 910 , 932 , 960 , 950 , 946 , 908 , 922 , 888 , 952 , 896 , 886 , 936 , 962 , 912 , 954 , 894 , 904 ) filed by Howard D. Ressler on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. Objections due by 7/29/2011, (Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Notice of Withdrawal of The Ravji Law Firm filed by Aamer Ravji on behalf of Al Munaf Corporation Al Munaf Corporation. (Ravji, Aamer) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Response of the Actrade Trustee to Allou Trustee's Objections to Approval of Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Among the Actrade Trustee, Pineview Investments Trading and Yonado Ltd. (related document(s) 634 , 629 ) filed by Philip D. Anker on behalf of Jonah M. Meer, the Trustee for the Actrade Liquidation Trust. with hearing to be held on 7/19/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (ALG) (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Anker, Philip) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Certificate of Service of Notice of Appearance (related document(s) 507 ) filed by Stephen A. Donato on behalf of OFI MGA Alpha Palmares, Palmares Europlus, UMR Select Alternatif. (Donato, Stephen) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
Notice of Appearance filed by Stephen A. Donato on behalf of UMR Select Alternatif, Palmares Europlus, OFI MGA Alpha Palmares. (Donato, Stephen) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
Affidavit of Service re: Reorganized Debtors' Objection To The Motion of Carlos Gonzalez For Relief From The Automatic Stay, Enforcing The Plan Provisions or Modifying The Discharge Injunction To Permit Movant To Proceed Against The Insurance Policies Covering Movant's Personal Injury Claims And For Reconsideration of The Movant's Proof of Claim (related document(s) 491 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC.(Vandell, Travis) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
Operating Report Reorganized Debtors' Quarterly Operating Report for the Period April 1, 2011 through June 30, 2011 filed by John Longmire on behalf of EnviroSolutions of New York, LLC. (Longmire, John) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Post-Confirmation Report. Reorganized Debtors' Fifth Post-Confirmation Status Report filed by John Longmire on behalf of EnviroSolutions of New York, LLC. (Longmire, John) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Memorandum Endorsed signed on 7/12/2011 Re: "The Court does not respond to letter inquiries. Counsel should contact the Attorneys for the Debtor for answers to his question." (related document(s) 478 ). (Ho, Amanda) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Notice of Dismissal Notice of Voluntary Dismissal re: Defendant Abbey National Securities filed by Sigmund S. Wissner-Gross on behalf of Edward S. Weisfelner, as Litigation Trustee of the LB Litigation Trust. (Wissner-Gross, Sigmund) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Disclosure Statement For Joint Chapter 11 Plan Of Liquidation filed by Allen G. Kadish on behalf of Bozel S.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Joint Chapter 11 Plan Of Liquidation# 2 Exhibit B - Liquidation Analysis# 3 Exhibit C - Non-Exhaustive List Of Preserved Causes Of Action)(Kadish, Allen) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Eamon Mason - Monthly Operating Report for the Period from September 1, 2011 to September 30, 2011; Notice of and Eighth Monthly Application of Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP for Interim Allowance of Compensation and for Reimbursement of Expenses for Services Rendered During the Period from September 1, 2011 through September 30, 2011 (related document(s) 243 , 242 ) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of The Garden City Group, Inc.. (Stein, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing with Respect to Debtor's Disclosure Statement filed by Fred B. Ringel on behalf of West End Financial Advisors LLC. with hearing to be held on 11/22/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) (Ringel, Fred) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
Revised Second Amended Preliminary Scheduling Order signed on 4/7/2011 for Redeemer Actions (related document(s) 209 ). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Presentment of Stipulation of Settlement (related document(s) 213 ) filed by Justin B. Singer on behalf of The Glazier Group, Inc.. (Singer, Justin) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
Notice of Hearing /Notice of Entry of Agreed Order Extending Authority for Interim Use of Cash Collateral filed by Lee William Stremba on behalf of Waterscape Resort LLC. with hearing to be held on 10/27/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) (Stremba, Lee) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Presentment of Stipulation of Settlement (related document(s) 205 ) filed by Justin B. Singer on behalf of The Glazier Group, Inc.. (Singer, Justin) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Presentment of Stipulation of Settlement (related document(s) 204 ) filed by Justin B. Singer on behalf of The Glazier Group, Inc.. (Singer, Justin) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Joinder of Farallon Defendants to Motion to Dismiss (related document(s) 158 ) filed by Matthew J. Gold on behalf of Tinicum Partners, L.P., Noonday Capital Partners LLC, Farallon Capital Partners, L.P., Farallon Capital Institutional Partners III, L.P., Farallon Capital Institutional Partners II, L.P., Farallon Capital Institutional Partners, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Pleading Certificate of Service) (Gold, Matthew) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (related document(s) 158 ) filed by Rebecca Brazzano on behalf of Keybank National Association. (Attachments: # 1 KeyBank National Association's Joinder in the Memorandum of Law of Co-Defendants in Support of their Motion to Dismiss the Complaint# 2 Certificate of Service) (Brazzano, Rebecca) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Notice of Dismissal Notice of Voluntary Dismissal re: Defendant Abbey National Securities filed by Sigmund S. Wissner-Gross on behalf of Edward S. Weisfelner, as Trustee of the LB Creditor Trust. (Wissner-Gross, Sigmund) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (related document(s) 158 ) filed by Tatyana Trakht on behalf of Timber Hill LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Joinder in Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Complaint) (Trakht, Tatyana) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Notice of Motion to Dismiss the Complaint (related document(s) 158 ) filed by Tatyana Trakht on behalf of KDC Merger Arbitrage Master. (Attachments: # 1 Joinder in Defendants' Motion Motion to Dismiss the Complaint) (Trakht, Tatyana) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Certificate of Service (related document(s) 149 , 150 , 145 , 163 , 148 , 192 , 158 ) filed by Philip D. Anker on behalf of Amalgamated Bank, BMO Nesbitt Burns SA, a/k/a BMO Nesbitt Burns Trading Corp. S.A., BMO Nesbitt Burns, a/k/a BMO Nesbitt Burns Inc., Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi, a/k/a Bank of Tokyo - Mitsubishi UFJ Trust Company, Brown Brothers Harriman, a/k/a Brown Brothers Harriman & Co., Credit Suisse Securities US, a/k/a Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC (as defined and named herein), Custodial Trust Company (as defined and named herein), Deutsche Bank Securities, a/k/a Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., (as defined and named herein), Elisabeth H Doft, Doft and Co., Inc., Edward D. Jones, a/k/a Edward D. Jones & Co., L.P., Ferris, Baker Watts, a/k/a Ferris, Baker Watts, Incorporated, HBK Master Fund L.P., J.P. Morgan Clearing Corp, MJR Partners, Mitsubishi UFJ Trust & Banking Corporation (U.S.A.), Morgan Stanley & Co., Incorporated (as defined and named herein), National Financial Services, PNC Bank, N.A., a/k/a National City Bank, RBC Dominion Securities, Scotia Capital, a/k/a Scotia Capital Inc., State Street Bank & Trust Company, Swiss American Securities, a/k/a Swiss American Securities, Inc., TD Waterhouse Canada, U.S. Bank N.A., Union Bank of California NA, n/k/a Union Bank, N.A.. (Anker, Philip) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (related document(s) 158 ) filed by Simon Miller on behalf of Alpine Associates. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Simon Miller in Support of Defendant Alpine Associates, a Limited Partnership's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint) (Miller, Simon) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding / Notice of Joinder in Co-Defendants' Notice of Motion to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss (related document(s) 163 , 158 ) filed by Lorna G. Schofield on behalf of Ray R Irani Ttee Ray R Irani Decl of Trust U/A Dtd 11/13/1990. Responses due by 5/23/2011, (Attachments: # 1 Joinder in Co-Defendants' Notice of Motion to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss) (Schofield, Lorna) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Certificate of Service of (a) Notice of Motion by Defendant The Northern Trust Company to Dismiss the Complaint, (b) Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant The Northern Trust Company to Dismiss the Complaint, and (c) Corporate Ownership Statement (related document(s) 157 , 156 , 155 ) filed by Robert A Johnston JR on behalf of Northern Trust Company. (Johnston, Robert) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (related document(s) 158 ) filed by Simon Miller on behalf of Alpine Associates. (Miller, Simon) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 197 , 199 ) filed by Matthew J Aaronson on behalf of Mizuho Trust and Banking Co., Ltd. (sued as Mizuho Trust & Banking Co., a/k/a Mizuho Trust and Banking Co., Ltd.). (Aaronson, Matthew) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss (related document(s) 197 ) filed by Matthew J Aaronson on behalf of Mizuho Trust and Banking Co., Ltd. (sued as Mizuho Trust & Banking Co., a/k/a Mizuho Trust and Banking Co., Ltd.). (Aaronson, Matthew) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding /Joinder of Primevest Financial Services, Inc. and Stephens Inc. in the Motion to Dismiss filed by Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP on Behalf of Morgan Stanley & Co. Incorporated (related document(s) 158 ) filed by William Hao on behalf of Primevest Financial Services, Stephens Inc.. (Hao, William) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Notice of Motion to Dismiss filed by Conrad Chiu on behalf of State Teachers Retirement System of Ohio. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Memorandum of Law in Support) (Chiu, Conrad) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Notice of Motion to Dismiss filed by Conrad Chiu on behalf of Fifth Third Bank. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Memorandum of Law in Support) (Chiu, Conrad) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Notice of Motion to Dismiss filed by Conrad Chiu on behalf of Comerica Bank. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Memorandum of Law in Support) (Chiu, Conrad) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding /Joinder in Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (related document(s) 188 , 158 ) filed by David J. Karp on behalf of Harvest AA Capital LP and Harvest Capital LP. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Karp, David) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Declaration of Jeremy S. Winer in Support of the Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Complaint (related document(s) 158 ) filed by Philip D. Anker on behalf of Amalgamated Bank, BMO Nesbitt Burns SA, a/k/a BMO Nesbitt Burns Trading Corp. S.A., BMO Nesbitt Burns, a/k/a BMO Nesbitt Burns Inc., Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi, a/k/a Bank of Tokyo - Mitsubishi UFJ Trust Company, Brown Brothers Harriman, a/k/a Brown Brothers Harriman & Co., Credit Suisse Securities US, a/k/a Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC (as defined and named herein), Custodial Trust Company (as defined and named herein), Deutsche Bank Securities, a/k/a Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., (as defined and named herein), Elisabeth H Doft, Doft and Co., Inc., Edward D. Jones, a/k/a Edward D. Jones & Co., L.P., Ferris, Baker Watts, a/k/a Ferris, Baker Watts, Incorporated, HBK Master Fund L.P., J.P. Morgan Clearing Corp., MJR Partners, Mitsubishi UFJ Trust & Banking Corporation (U.S.A.), Morgan Stanley & Co., Incorporated (as defined and named herein), National Financial Services, PNC Bank, N.A., a/k/a National City Bank, RBC Dominion Securities, Scotia Capital, a/k/a Scotia Capital Inc., State Street Bank & Trust Company, Swiss American Securities, a/k/a Swiss American Securities, Inc., TD Waterhouse Canada, U.S. Bank N.A., Union Bank of California NA, n/k/a Union Bank, N.A.. Objections due by 5/23/2011, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J) (Anker, Philip) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (related document(s) 187 ) filed by John Winship Read on behalf of Ohio Carpenters Midcap. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Read, John) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding /Notice of Motion to Dismiss filed by David J. Karp on behalf of Harvest AA Capital LP and Harvest Capital LP. (Karp, David) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by John Winship Read on behalf of Ohio Carpenters Midcap. Responses due by 5/23/2011, (Read, John) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Certificate of Service for Joinder and Notice of Joinder in Co-Defendants' Notice of Motion to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss (related document(s) 181 , 175 ) filed by James Matthew Vaughn on behalf of A Holmes & H Holmes Ttee, James Floyd Bisset Charles Schwab & Co Inc Cust IRA Contributory, Jesus Chagoya & Rose Mary Chagoya JT Ten, Kirk E Heyne & Karen A Twitchell Ten/Com, Robert S Bridges & Linda A Bridges Jt Ten, Sandra A Smith Ten/Com, Eric A Silva, Laura N Tucker. (Vaughn, James) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding by David K. Momborquette filed by David J. Karp on behalf of Harvest AA Capital LP and Harvest Capital LP. (Karp, David) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding / Notice of Motion to Dismiss and Joinder in Co-Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (related document(s) 163 , 158 ) filed by Ana M. Alfonso on behalf of Credit Agricole Securities (USA) Inc. (f/k/a Calyon Securities (USA) Inc.), PSAM Europe Master Fund Ltd., PSAM WorldArb Master Fund Ltd., Touradji Diversified Master Fund Ltd., Touradji Global Resources Master Fund, Ltd.. (Alfonso, Ana) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding by David J. Karp filed by David J. Karp on behalf of Harvest AA Capital LP and Harvest Capital LP. (Karp, David) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Notice of Joinder in Co-Defendants' Notice of Motion to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss (related document(s) 175 ) filed by James Matthew Vaughn on behalf of A Holmes & H Holmes Ttee, Jesus Chagoya & Rose Mary Chagoya JT Ten, Kirk E Heyne & Karen A Twitchell Ten/Com, Robert S Bridges & Linda A Bridges Jt Ten, Sandra A Smith Ten/Com, Eric A Silva, Laura N Tucker. (Vaughn, James) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Certificate of Service of Memorandum of Law, Declaration in Support, and Notice of Motion to Dismiss (related document(s) 136 ) filed by David S Mordkoff on behalf of AG Edwards & Sons (as defined and named herein), First Clearing, LLC, Morgan Keegan & Co., Wachovia Bank N.A. (as defined and named herein), Wells Fargo Bank, NA (as defined and named herein), Wells Fargo Investment LLC (as defined and named herein). (Mordkoff, David) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Laurence Silverman on behalf of Abbey National Securities. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law) (Silverman, Laurence) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Karin E. Fisch on behalf of Diane L Abbey. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Memorandum of Law in Support) (Fisch, Karin) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Joinder in Co-Defendants' Notice of Motion to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss (related document(s) 158 ) filed by James Matthew Vaughn on behalf of A Holmes & H Holmes Ttee, James Floyd Bisset Charles Schwab & Co Inc Cust IRA Contributory, Jesus Chagoya & Rose Mary Chagoya JT Ten, Kirk E Heyne & Karen A Twitchell Ten/Com, Robert S Bridges & Linda A Bridges Jt Ten, Sandra A Smith Ten/Com, Eric A Silva, Laura N Tucker. (Vaughn, James) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding / Motion to Dismiss Complaint and Joinder of Sacramento County Employees' Retirement System in Motion of the Defendants to Dismiss the Complaint (related document(s) 163 , 158 ) filed by Melvin A. Brosterman on behalf of Sacramento County Employees' Retirement System. (Brosterman, Melvin) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by William A. Rome on behalf of Peter Randall Zierhut Gayle M Zierhut Jt Ten. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Motion to Dismiss) (Rome, William) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (related document(s) 1 ) filed by David B. Galle on behalf of David S Macallaster Charles Schwab & Co Inc Cust IRA Contributory. (Galle, David) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding filed by William A. Rome on behalf of Peter Randall Zierhut Gayle M Zierhut Jt Ten. (Rome, William) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by William A. Rome on behalf of Geza Szayer / Paulette Szayer Jt Ten TOD Dtd 10/24/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Motion to Dismiss) (Rome, William) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding filed by William A. Rome on behalf of Geza Szayer / Paulette Szayer Jt Ten TOD Dtd 10/24/2008. (Rome, William) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Notice of Presentment of Order Approving Motion of Edward S. Weisfelner, as Litigation Trustee of the LB Litigation Trust for an Order Extending Time for Service of Process of the Complaint (related document(s) 165 ) filed by Sigmund S. Wissner-Gross on behalf of Edward S. Weisfelner, as Litigation Trustee of the LB Litigation Trust. with presentment to be held on 4/21/2011 (check with court for location) Objections due by 4/21/2011, (Wissner-Gross, Sigmund) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding / Joinder in Motion to Dismiss and Reservation of Rights (related document(s) 163 , 158 ) filed by William H. Schrag on behalf of Track Data Corporation. Responses due by 5/23/2011, (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Schrag, William) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Notice of Motion to Set Hearing re Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (related document(s) 164 ) filed by William A. Rome on behalf of Arbor Place LImited Partnership A Partnership. (Rome, William) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Motion to Approve Motion of Edward S. Weisfelner, as Litigation Trustee of the LB Litigation Trust for an Order Extending Time for Service of Process of the Complaint filed by Sigmund S. Wissner-Gross on behalf of Edward S. Weisfelner, as Litigation Trustee of the LB Litigation Trust. Responses due by 4/21/2011, (Wissner-Gross, Sigmund) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by William A. Rome on behalf of Arbor Place LImited Partnership A Partnership. (Rome, William) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (related document(s) 158 ) filed by Philip D. Anker on behalf of Amalgamated Bank, BMO Nesbitt Burns SA, a/k/a BMO Nesbitt Burns Trading Corp. S.A., BMO Nesbitt Burns, a/k/a BMO Nesbitt Burns Inc., Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi, a/k/a Bank of Tokyo - Mitsubishi UFJ Trust Company, Brown Brothers Harriman, a/k/a Brown Brothers Harriman & Co., Credit Suisse Securities US, a/k/a Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC (as defined and named herein), Custodial Trust Company (as defined and named herein), Deutsche Bank Securities, a/k/a Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., (as defined and named herein), Elisabeth H Doft, Doft and Co., Inc., Edward D. Jones, a/k/a Edward D. Jones & Co., L.P., Ferris, Baker Watts, a/k/a Ferris, Baker Watts, Incorporated, HBK Master Fund L.P., J.P. Morgan Clearing Corp., MJR Partners, Mitsubishi UFJ Trust & Banking Corporation (U.S.A.), Morgan Stanley & Co., Incorporated (as defined and named herein), National Financial Services, PNC Bank, N.A., a/k/a National City Bank, RBC Dominion Securities, Scotia Capital, a/k/a Scotia Capital Inc., State Street Bank & Trust Company, Swiss American Securities, a/k/a Swiss American Securities, Inc., TD Waterhouse Canada, U.S. Bank N.A., Union Bank of California NA, n/k/a Union Bank, N.A.. Objections due by 5/23/2011, (Anker, Philip) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding / Motion of Defendant Trustmark National Bank, Pursuant to Rules 9(b), 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, as Made Applicable to this Adversary Proceeding by Bankruptcy Rules 7009(b) and 7012, to Dismiss Adversary Complaint filed by Irena M. Goldstein on behalf of Trustmark National Bank. Responses due by 5/23/2011, (Goldstein, Irena) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Craig Scott Hilliard on behalf of Cato Enterprises LLC Arbitrage Account. (Hilliard, Craig) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Craig Scott Hilliard on behalf of Cato Enterprises LLC Arbitrage Account. (Hilliard, Craig) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (related document(s) 1 ) filed by Michael M. Krauss on behalf of American Enterprise Investment Services. Responses due by 5/23/2011, (Krauss, Michael) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Philip D. Anker on behalf of State Street Bank & Trust Company, Doft and Co., Inc., Mitsubishi UFJ Trust & Banking Corporation (U.S.A.), State Street Bank & Trust Company, Amalgamated Bank, BMO Nesbitt Burns SA, a/k/a BMO Nesbitt Burns Trading Corp. S.A., BMO Nesbitt Burns, a/k/a BMO Nesbitt Burns Inc., Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi, a/k/a Bank of Tokyo - Mitsubishi UFJ Trust Company, Brown Brothers Harriman, a/k/a Brown Brothers Harriman & Co., Credit Suisse Securities US, a/k/a Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC (as defined and named herein), Custodial Trust Company (as defined and named herein), Deutsche Bank Securities, a/k/a Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., (as defined and named herein), Elisabeth H Doft, Edward D. Jones, a/k/a Edward D. Jones & Co., L.P., Ferris, Baker Watts, a/k/a Ferris, Baker Watts, Incorporated, HBK Master Fund L.P., J.P. Morgan Clearing Corp., MJR Partners, Morgan Stanley & Co., Incorporated (as defined and named herein), National Financial Services, PNC Bank, N.A., a/k/a National City Bank, RBC Dominion Securities, Scotia Capital, a/k/a Scotia Capital Inc., Swiss American Securities, a/k/a Swiss American Securities, Inc., TD Waterhouse Canada, U.S. Bank N.A., Union Bank of California NA, n/k/a Union Bank, N.A.. Responses due by 5/23/2011, (Anker, Philip) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Corporate Ownership Statement of Defendant The Northern Trust Company. filed by Robert A Johnston JR on behalf of Northern Trust Company. (Johnston, Robert) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant The Northern Trust Company to Dismiss the Complaint (related document(s) 155 ) filed by Robert A Johnston JR on behalf of Northern Trust Company. (Johnston, Robert) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint (related document(s) 152 ) filed by Michael Luskin on behalf of Ingalls & Snyder LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Luskin, Michael) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Corporate Ownership Statement . Corporate Affiliates added to case:, HBK Fund II L.P., HBK Offshore Fund II L.P.. filed by Philip D. Anker on behalf of HBK Master Fund L.P.. (Anker, Philip) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Motion to Dismiss Case Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint filed by Michael Luskin on behalf of Ingalls & Snyder LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Luskin, Michael) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Corporate Ownership Statement . Corporate Affiliates added to case:, U.S. Bancorp. filed by Philip D. Anker on behalf of U.S. Bank N.A.. (Anker, Philip) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding filed by Ross E. Firsenbaum on behalf of HBK Master Fund L.P., U.S. Bank N.A.. (Firsenbaum, Ross) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding filed by Jeremy S. Winer on behalf of HBK Master Fund L.P., U.S. Bank N.A.. (Winer, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding filed by Peter J. Macdonald on behalf of HBK Master Fund L.P., U.S. Bank N.A.. (Macdonald, Peter) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Courtney E. Scott on behalf of Working Womans Home Assoc. (Scott, Courtney) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding filed by Philip D. Anker on behalf of HBK Master Fund L.P., U.S. Bank N.A.. (Anker, Philip) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding filed by Ana M. Alfonso on behalf of Touradji Diversified Master Fund Ltd., Touradji Global Resources Master Fund, Ltd., PSAM WorldArb Master Fund Ltd., PSAM Europe Master Fund Ltd., Credit Agricole Securities (USA) Inc. (f/k/a Calyon Securities (USA) Inc.). (Alfonso, Ana) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Declaration of David S. Mordkoff in Support of the Wells Fargo/Morgan Keegan Firms' Motion to Dismiss the Complaint (related document(s) 136 ) filed by Stephen Leonard Ratner on behalf of AG Edwards & Sons (as defined and named herein), First Clearing, LLC, Morgan Keegan & Co., Wachovia Bank N.A. (as defined and named herein), Wells Fargo Bank, NA (as defined and named herein), Wells Fargo Investment LLC (as defined and named herein). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Memorandum of Law in Support of the Well Fargo/Morgan Keegan Firms' Motion to Dismiss the Complaint in Creditor Trust Action (Weisfelner v. Morgan Stanley & Co. Adv. Pro No. 10-4609) (Ratner, Stephen) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Memorandum of Law In Support of the Motion to Dismiss (related document(s) 136 ) filed by Stephen Leonard Ratner on behalf of AG Edwards & Sons (as defined and named herein), First Clearing, LLC, Morgan Keegan & Co., Wachovia Bank N.A. (as defined and named herein), Wells Fargo Bank, NA (as defined and named herein), Wells Fargo Investment LLC (as defined and named herein). (Ratner, Stephen) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Rebecca Sluss filed by David B. Galle on behalf of David S Macallaster Charles Schwab & Co Inc Cust IRA Contributory. (Galle, David) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of David B. Galle filed by David B. Galle on behalf of David S Macallaster Charles Schwab & Co Inc Cust IRA Contributory. (Galle, David) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Stephen Leonard Ratner on behalf of AG Edwards & Sons (as defined and named herein), First Clearing, LLC, Morgan Keegan & Co., Wachovia Bank N.A. (as defined and named herein), Wells Fargo Bank, NA (as defined and named herein), Wells Fargo Investment LLC (as defined and named herein). (Ratner, Stephen) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Steven D. Atlee filed by Steven Schwartz on behalf of Young Family1989 Trust. (Schwartz, Steven) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (related document(s) 1 ) filed by Charles E. Reynolds on behalf of William Luke & Agnes Boswell. (Reynolds, Charles) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
First Application for Interim Professional Compensation of Deloitte Tax LLP for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses as Tax Services Provider to the TSC Debtors for the Period from February 16, 2011 through May 31, 2011 for Deloitte Tax LLP, Accountant, period: 2/16/2011 to 5/31/2011, fee:$186,620.00, expenses: $1,701.84. filed by Deloitte Tax LLP. (Dizengoff, Ira) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
First Application for Interim Professional Compensation of Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP for Approval and Allowance of Compensation and for Reimbursement of Expenses for Services Rendered During the Period from February 16, 2011 through May 31, 2011 for Ira S. Dizengoff, Debtor's Attorney, period: 2/16/2011 to 5/31/2011, fee:$559,071.50, expenses: $17,063.34. filed by Ira S. Dizengoff. (Dizengoff, Ira) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
First Application for Interim Professional Compensation of Blackstone Advisory Partners L.P. as Financial Advisor to the Debtors for Allowance of Compensation for Actual and Necessary Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Actual and Necessary Out-of-Pocket Expenses Incurred for the Period of February 16, 2011 through May 31, 2011 for Blackstone Advisory Partners L.P., Consultant, period: 2/16/2011 to 5/31/2011, fee:$123,214.29, expenses: $101.32. filed by Blackstone Advisory Partners L.P.. (Dizengoff, Ira) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Second Monthly Fee Statement of Deloitte Tax LLP for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses as Tax Services Provider to the TSC Debtors for the Period from May 1, 2011 through May 31, 2011 filed by Ira S. Dizengoff on behalf of TerreStar Corporation. (Dizengoff, Ira) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Third Agreed Order Signed on 7/15/2011 Authorizing Interim Use of Cash Collateral. (related document(s) 103 , 8 , 14 ) Fourth Cash Collateral Hearing to be held on 8/18/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723. (SMB) (Epps, Juanita) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Corporate Ownership Statement . Corporate Affiliates added to case:, EFG International AG and EFG Bank AG. filed by David Farrington Yates on behalf of EFG Bank (Monaco) f/k/aEFG Eurofinancier DInvest MCL. (Yates, David) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Corporate Ownership Statement . Corporate Affiliates added to case:, EFG International AG. filed by David Farrington Yates on behalf of EFG Bank AG a/k/a EFG Bank SA Switzerland. (Yates, David) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Notice of Appearance filed by David Farrington Yates on behalf of EFG Bank AG a/k/a EFG Bank SA Switzerland and EFG Bank (Monaco) f/k/a EFG Eurofinancier DInvest MCL... (Yates, David) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Notice of Appearance filed by David Farrington Yates on behalf of EFG Bank AG a/k/a EFG Bank SA Switzerland and EFG Bank (Monaco) f/k/a EFG Eurofinancier DInvest MCL.. (Yates, David) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 84 ) filed by Avrum J. Rosen on behalf of Joseph F Uvino, Wendy M Uvino. (Rosen, Avrum) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Motion to Approve Debtors' Disclosure Statement, Approve the Solicitation Procedures, Forms of Ballots and Manner of Notice, and Fixing the Date for a Hearing on Confirmation and Objection Deadline filed by Avrum J. Rosen on behalf of Joseph F Uvino. with hearing to be held on 8/16/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) Responses due by 8/9/2011, (Attachments: # 1 Application in Support# 2 Exhibit A- Corrected Disclosure Statement (without exhibits)# 3 Exhibit B- Proposed Order# 4 Exhibit C- Proposed Notice of Order# 5 Exhibit D- Ballot) (Rosen, Avrum) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Notice of Hearing on Motion for Entry of an Order Approving the Adequacy of the Disclosure Statement and Scheduling a Confirmation Hearing (related document(s) 82 ) filed by Avrum J. Rosen on behalf of Joseph F Uvino. with hearing to be held on 8/16/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) Objections due by 8/9/2011, (Attachments: # 1 proposed order)(Rosen, Avrum) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Disclosure Statement Corrected (to include administrative claims) filed by Avrum J. Rosen on behalf of Joseph F Uvino. (Attachments: # 1 Redlined disclosure statement)(Rosen, Avrum) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of all Notices and Papers on Behalf of Garadex Inc. and Gatex Properties Inc. filed by Edward Smith on behalf of Garadex Inc., Gatex Properties Inc.. (Smith, Edward) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Affidavit of Service [Supplemental] of David C. Cooper of the Notice of Deadline Requiring Filing of Proofs of Claim On or Before November 23, 2011 (related document(s) 57 , 48 , 47 ) filed by Sheldon Ira Hirshon on behalf of 785 Partners LLC. (Hirshon, Sheldon) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
Affidavit of Service of David C. Cooper of (i) the Debtor's Amended Plan of Reorganization Pursuant to Chapter 11 of the Bankruptcy Code, (ii) the Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Section 1125 of the Bankruptcy Code for the Amended Plan, (iii) the Debtor's Motion for Entry of an Order (a) Approving Disclosure Statement; (b) Establishing Voting Record Date, Voting Deadline, and Other Dates; (c) Approving Procedures for Soliciting, Receiving, and Tabulating Votes on Plan and for Filing Objections to Plan; and (d) Approving Manner and Forms of Notice and Other Related Documents, and (iv) the Notice of Disclosure Statement Hearing (related document(s) 70 , 72 , 71 ) filed by Sheldon Ira Hirshon on behalf of 785 Partners LLC. (Hirshon, Sheldon) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
Motion to Approve : Notice of Motion and Debtor's Motion for Entry of an Order (a) Approving Disclosure Statement; (b) Establishing Voting Record Date, Voting Deadline, and Other Dates; (c) Approving Procedures for Soliciting, Receiving, and Tabulating Votes on Plan and for Filing Objections to Plan; and (d) Approving Manner and Forms of Notice and Other Related Documents (related document(s) 70 , 71 ) filed by Sheldon Ira Hirshon on behalf of 785 Partners LLC. with hearing to be held on 12/6/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 11/29/2011, (Hirshon, Sheldon) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
Objection to Motion /Objection by First Manhattan Developments REIT to Debtor's Application for Order Authorizing Employment and Retention of the Weitzman Group, Inc. as Real Estate and Financial Consultant to the Debtor Nunc Pro Tunc to September 27, 2011 (related document(s) 55 ) filed by Gerard R. Luckman on behalf of First Manhattan Developments REIT. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Affidavit of Service) (Luckman, Gerard) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
Stipulation Extending Time to Respond and Designating Email Address Upon Which to Serve Defendant [Citi Hedge Fund Services, Ltd.] filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Stipulation Extending Time To Respond And Designating Email Address Upon Which To Serve Defendants [The Ashby Trust, The El Prela Trust, Port of HerculesTrustees Limited, El Prela Group Holding Services Limited, Ashby Holding Services Limited, Ashby Investment Services Limited, and El Prela Trading Investments Limited] filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Stipulation Extending Time To Respond And Designating Email Address Upon Which To Serve Defendants filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Memorandum of Law in Support of Citibank N.A., Citicorp North America, Inc. and Citigroup Global Markets Limited's Motion to Withdraw the Reference, dated November 1, 2011 (related document(s) 28 ) filed by Carmine Boccuzzi on behalf of Citibank North America, Inc., Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Limited. (Boccuzzi, Carmine) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
Declaration of Jerilin Buzzetta in Support of Citibank N.A., Citicorp North America, Inc. and Citigroup Global Markets Limited's Motion to Withdraw the Reference to the Bankruptcy Court, dated November 1, 2011 (related document(s) 28 ) filed by Carmine Boccuzzi on behalf of Citibank North America, Inc., Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-F) (Boccuzzi, Carmine) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
Motion to Withdraw the Reference /Notice of Motion of Defendants Citibank, N.A., Citicorp North America, Inc. and Citigroup Global Markets Limited to Withdraw the Reference to the Bankruptcy Court, dated November 1, 2011 filed by Carmine Boccuzzi on behalf of Citibank North America, Inc., Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Limited. (Boccuzzi, Carmine) (Entered: 11/01/2011)
Stipulation Extending the Trustee's Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Adjourning the Hearing Date to April 25, 2012 filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
Stipulation Extending the Trustee's Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Adjourning the Hearing Date to April 25, 2012 filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
Memorandum of Law in Support of Natixis' Motion to Dismiss the Trustee's Complaint or, in the alternative, to Stay the Action (related document(s) 18 ) filed by Joseph Cioffi on behalf of Bloom Asset Holdings Fund, Natixis, Natixis Corporate & Investment Bank (f/n/a Ixis Corporate & Investment Bank, Natixis Financial Products, Inc.. (Cioffi, Joseph) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Statement (Corporate Disclosure Statement of Certain Named Defendants) filed by Joseph Cioffi on behalf of Bloom Asset Holdings Fund, Natixis, Natixis Corporate & Investment Bank (f/n/a Ixis Corporate & Investment Bank, Natixis Financial Products, Inc.. (Cioffi, Joseph) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Declaration of Joseph Cioffi in Support of Natixis' Motion to Dismiss, or in the alternative, to Stay the Action (related document(s) 18 ) filed by Joseph Cioffi on behalf of Bloom Asset Holdings Fund, Natixis, Natixis Corporate & Investment Bank (f/n/a Ixis Corporate & Investment Bank, Natixis Financial Products, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 12/14/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) Objections due by 10/19/2011, Reply due by 12/7/2011, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1) (Cioffi, Joseph) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding or, In the Alternative, to Stay the Action (related document(s) 1 , 8 ) filed by Joseph Cioffi on behalf of Bloom Asset Holdings Fund, Natixis, Natixis Corporate & Investment Bank (f/n/a Ixis Corporate & Investment Bank, Natixis Financial Products, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 12/14/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) Responses due by 10/19/2011, (Cioffi, Joseph) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Stipulation filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 06/16/2011)
So Ordered Stipulation signed on 4/14/2011 Between Trustee Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and Bernard L. Madoff and Defendants Citibank, N.A., Citibank North America, Inc. and Citigroup Global Markets Limited. RE: Extending Time to Respond. (Saenz De Viteri, Monica) (Entered: 04/14/2011)
Notice of Appearance Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Papers filed by Helen Chaitman on behalf of Marsha Peshkin. (Chaitman, Helen) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Affidavit of Service re Amended Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Daniel T. Donovan, Amended Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Jeffrey S. Powell, Amended Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Papers, Motion to Consolidate for Trial and Notice of Hearing (related document(s) 8 , 9 , 7 , 13 , 12 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Statement / Plaintiffs' Rule 9027(e)(3) Statement filed by Marc D. Powers on behalf of The Extended Stay Litigation Trust, Hobart Truesdell, Walker, Truesdell, Roth & Associates. (Powers, Marc) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Affidavit of Service re Amended Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Daniel T. Donovan, Amended Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Jeffrey S. Powell, Amended Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Papers, Motion to Consolidate for Trial and Notice of Hearing (related document(s) 7 , 10 , 6 , 5 , 11 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
Notice of Appearance Dated March 10, 2011 filed by Carmine Boccuzzi on behalf of Citibank North America, Inc., Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Limited. (Boccuzzi, Carmine) (Entered: 03/10/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Redacted Complaint against all defendants (related document(s) 9 ) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and Bernard L. Madoff. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 02/21/2011)
Stipulation Extending Time To Respond And Designating Email Address Upon Which To Serve Defendant (related document(s) 4 , 3 , 1 ) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
So Ordered Stipulation signed on 2/16/2011 Between Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and Bernard L. Madoff and for Defendants Citibank, N.A., Citibank North America, Inc. and Citigroup Global Markets Limited. RE: Filing of Redacted Complaint. (Saenz De Viteri, Monica) (Entered: 02/16/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Adjournment of the Pre-Trial Conference to September 27, 2011 (related document(s) 6 ) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and Bernard L. Madoff. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Notice of Adjournment of the Pre-Trial Conference to September 27, 2011 filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and Bernard L. Madoff. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 02/09/2011)
So Ordered Stipulation signed on 2/9/2011 Between Trustee Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and Bernard L. Madoff and Defendants Citibank, N.A., Citibank North America, Inc. and Citigroup Global Markets Limited. RE: Filing of a Redacted Version of the Complaint. (Saenz De Viteri, Monica) (Entered: 02/09/2011)
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/29/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL), Answer due by 3/7/2011, (Gomez, Jessica) (Entered: 02/04/2011)
So Ordered Stipulation signed on 1/14/2011 Between Plaintiff Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and Bernard L. Madoff and Defendants Citibank, N.A., Citibank North America, Inc. and Citigroup Global Markets Limited. RE: Extending Defendants' Time to Answer. (Saenz De Viteri, Monica) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
Statement with Complaint( Filed Under Seal) (related document(s) 1 ) filed by Keith R. Murphy on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and Bernard L. Madoff. (Chou, Rosalyn) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
(This document is unsealed pursuant to an order signed on 4/12/2011 in lead case number 08-1789 and is now available for view) Complaint against Citibank, N.A., Citibank North America, Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Limited. Nature(s) of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and Bernard L. Madoff. (Murphy, Keith) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/18/2011 (Bush, Brent) (Entered: 12/08/2010)