Calico Commerce IPO, et al v. Calico Commerce, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-02601
District Judge Shira A. Scheindlin, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Allen Sumner, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Cynthia Hui, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Dane Chin, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com
No Logo Marshall Hui, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Paul Statham, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
No Logo SDR Investors, LP, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lovell Stewart Halebian Jacobson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Christopher Lovell +1 212 608 1900 +1 212 719 4677 clovell@lshllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sirota & Sirota, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Saul Roffe +1 609 791 7007 +1 609 896 9060 saul@sirotalaw.com
v.
The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Goldman Sachs Group, Inc."

Represented by Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

JPMorgan Securities, Inc. JPMorgan Securities, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, CHEMICAL BANKING CORP
Unknown Role, Peloton Resources Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Joseph M. McLaughlin +1 212 455 2000 jmclaughlin@stblaw.com
Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc. Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Incorporated"
Unknown Role, Cumulus Media Inc.
Unknown Role, Lodgian, Inc.
Unknown Role, Mlgpe Ltd
Merrill Lynch GP Inc. Unknown Role, Merrill Lynch GP Inc.
Unknown Role, Infospace.com, Inc.
Unknown Role, New BlackRock, Inc.
Unknown Role, NATIONSBANK CORP
Bank of America, NA Unknown Role, Bank of America, NA
Unknown Role, Gabelli Utility Fund
Unknown Role, Muniholdings Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Munienhanced Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Munivest Fund II Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Clifford Chance, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY MARK HOLLAND +1 212 878 8432 +1 212 878 8375 mark.holland@cliffordchance.com
No Logo Robertson Stephens, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Brendan Joseph Dowd +1 212 326 2000 +1 212 326 2061 bdowd@omm.com
No Logo Blime Feldhiem, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY MEL E. LIFSHITZ +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218
No Logo Dane Chin, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
No Logo George Soulintzis, Consolidated Plaintiff

Represented by Harwood Feffer LLP

No Logo Gregory Rigby, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Brodsky & Smith LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Evan Jason Smith +1 610 667 6200 +1 610 667 9029 esmith@brodsky-smith.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gottlieb, Rackman & Reisman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Paul Jeffrey Geller +1 561 750 3000 +1 561 750 3364 e_file_fl@rgrdlaw.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Samuel Howard Rudman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 srudman@rgrdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Brian M. Felgoise

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE Brian M Felgoise +1 215 886 1900 felgoiselaw@verizon.net

Represented by Milberg LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Seeger Weiss LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY David R. Buchanan +1 212 584 0700 +1 212 584 0799 DBuchanan@SeegerWeiss.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen A. Weiss +1 212 584 0700 +1 212 584 0799 sweiss@seegerweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson & Wright

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY STUART LANE BERMAN +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 sberman@ktmc.com
No Logo Henry Mayer, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Gregory Mark Nespole +1 212 545 4657 +1 212 545 4693 nespole@whafh.com
No Logo Joseph Spinden, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Murray Frank & Sailer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Marvin Lawrence Frank +1 212 682 1818 +1 212 682 1892 mfrank@murrayfrank.com
No Logo Lothar Trumpp, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Gregory Mark Nespole +1 212 545 4657 +1 212 545 4693 nespole@whafh.com
No Logo Zvi Weinreb, Consolidated Plaintiff
The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Consolidated Defendant
Officially listed as "Goldman Sachs & Co."

Toggle Switch Represented by Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Penny Shane +1 212 558 4000 +1 212 558 3588 shanep@sullcrom.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 77
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (44) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 44 Filed: 11/25/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT, Settleing action. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 11/24/09) (Attachments: # 1 Notice of aRight to Appeal)(dt) (Entered: 11/30/2009)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/13/2003, Entered: None
    ANSWER to Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. Related document: 33 Amended Complaint filed by Dane Chin, Marshall Hui, Paul Statham, Allen Sumner, Cynthia Hui.(sac, ) (Entered: 03/26/2004)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: None
      ANSWER by Goldman Sachs & Co. to [33-1] amended complaint . (Attorney Penny Shane from the Firm: Sullivan & Cromwell, LLP). (sac) (Entered: 09/18/2003)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: None
        ANSWER by Merrill Lynch to [33-1] amended complaint . (Attorney Mark Holland from the Firm: Clifford Chance US, LLP). (sac) (Entered: 09/15/2003)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: None
          ANSWER by Robertson Stephens to [33-1] amended complaint. (Attorney Brendan Joseph Dowd from the O'Melveny & Myers, LLP)... rec'd in the night deposit box on 7/21/03 at 7:25 p.m. (sac) (Entered: 08/19/2003)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: None
            ANSWER by J.P. Morgan Sec. to [33-1] amended complaint. (Attorney Joseph M. McLaughlin from the Simpson, Thacher & Bartlett, LLP)... rec'd in the night deposit box on 7/21/03 at 6:31 p.m. (sac) (Entered: 08/12/2003)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/15/2003, Entered: None
              NOTICE of REGISTRATION AND FIRM NAME CHANGE by Goldman Sachs Group. Re: Sullivan & Cromwell LLP. (jw) (Entered: 03/06/2003)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/24/2002, Entered: None
                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Bancboston Robertson by Stephen Austin, managing agent, on 6/14/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/30/2002)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/25/2002, Entered: None
                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Credit Suisse First by Janine Schampier, managing agent, on 6/13/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/29/2002)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/24/2002, Entered: None
                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Goldman Sachs Group by Patricia A. McGraw on 6/13/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/26/2002)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/24/2002, Entered: None
                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Merrill Lynch by Ethel Lambret, managing agent, on 6/13/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/26/2002)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None
                        AMENDED COMPLAINT by Marshall Hui, Paul Statham, Allen Sumner, Cynthia Hui, Dane Chin amending [24-1] complaint, [1-1] complaint ; Summons issued. (ac) (Entered: 06/11/2002)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/9/2002, Entered: None
                          AMENDED RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by The Goldman Sachs. (sac) (Entered: 02/12/2002)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: None
                            RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Robertson Stephens. (sac) (Entered: 02/05/2002)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/26/2001, Entered: None
                              RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Goldman Sachs & Co. (ICMSUSER) Modified on 10/25/2001 (Entered: 10/10/2001)
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/20/2001, Entered: None
                                RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Credit Suisse First . (ICMSUSER) Modified on 10/25/2001 (Entered: 10/10/2001)
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/7/2001, Entered: None
                                  RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by SDR Investors, LP . (ICMSUSER) Modified on 10/25/2001 (Entered: 10/10/2001)
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/7/2001, Entered: None
                                    RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Merrill Lynch . (ICMSUSER) Modified on 10/25/2001 (Entered: 10/10/2001)
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/4/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER,... that all cases involving Calico in this IPO Securities Litigation, as set forth in the attached Rider (1:01-cv-02699, 1:01-cv-02898, 1:01-cv-03121, 1:01-cv-03275, 1:01-cv-03572 and 1:01-cv-03694) shall be consolidated into case number 01 Civ. 2601. The Clerk of Court is hereby ordered to consolidate any future cases that are designated as related to 01 Civ. 2601 ,... the Clerk of Court is further ordered to close all cases that have been consolidated, subject to re-opening at a later dat on proper application by a party ... ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. [Original filed in 1:01-cv-02601 Document No. 26. Document Docketed in 1:01-cv-02699; 1:01-cv-02898; 1:01-cv-03121; 1:01-cv-03275; 1:01-cv-03572; 1:01-cv-03694] (dcap) (Entered: 10/25/2001)
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        Notice of Case Reassignment to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. Copy of notice mailed to Attorney(s) of record. Pursuant to the Order of Chief Judge Mukasey dated August 8, 2001, the above entitled action is reassigned to the calendar of Judge Shira A. Scheindlin for inclusion in the coordinated pretrial proceedings being conducted by that judge. Two originals of all future documents submitted in this action are to be presented in the Clerk's Office for filing. One original is to be filed in this docket number and one original is to be filed in the miscellaneous case number 21mc92 (SAS). Each shall bear the original assigned judge's ( ) initials after the original docket number. Attached is a copy of Judge Mukasey's ORDER re: coordinating the proceedings before Judge Scheindlin. Also attached is a copy of Judge Scheindlin's ORDER re: set initial PTC 09/07/01 and directing all counsel to comply with Judge Scheindlin's requirements. [Original Orders docketed in 21mc92 (SAS) as documents numbers 1 and 2] (dcap) Modified on 08/10/2001 (Entered: 08/10/2001)
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/3/2001, Entered: None
                                          CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed by Lead Plaintiffs. (sn) (Entered: 08/07/2001)
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/2/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            Transcript of record of proceedings before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin for the date(s) of 0/12/01. (rmo) (Entered: 08/02/2001)
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/19/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER; for good cause shown, plaintiffs shall file a Consolidated Complaint on or before 08/03/01 ; defendants' time to answer or otherwise respond is extended until 09/17/01 ; (signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. (djc) (Entered: 07/20/2001)
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/18/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER; that 01 Civ. 2601 (Lead Case) is hereby consolidated with 01 Civ. 2699; 01 Civ. 2898; 01 Civ. 3121; 01 Civ.3275; 01 Civ. 3572; 01 Civ. 3694 (Mem. Cases), for all purs. to Rule 42(a) of the FRCP. The Clerk of the Court shall file all pleadings in any of the actions in the Master File and shall note such filing in the Master Docket. No further copies need be filed or docket entries made. Class members Cynthia Yuen Lai Hui, Marshall Hui, Paul Statham and Allen Sonner are hereby appointed lead pltffs purs. to Section 27(a)(3)(B) of the Securities Act of 1933, 15 U.S.C. 77z-1(a)(3)(B) and Section 21D(a)(3)(B) of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934, 15 U.S.C. 78u-4(a)(3)(B). This appointment is without prejudice to defts' right to challenge the adequacy, typically, or ability of those pltffs to represent the absent class members in this consolidated action or the propriety of this case being certified as a class action. The Court makes no findings purs. to FRCP 23 as to the representative status of any pltff for the purpose of dismissing the issue of class certification. Lead pltffs' selection of Bernstein Liebhard & Lifshitz, LLP and Schiffrin & Barroway, LLP as co-lead counsel for all pltffs and the Class in this consolidated action is approved. The Proposed Lead Pltff, through Pltffs' Lead Counsel, shall file a consolidated class action complaint within 30 days of the entry of this Order. The defts shall answer or otherwise respond to the Consolidated Complaint within 45 days after its service. ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. (sac) Modified on 10/25/2001 (Entered: 06/20/2001)
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/14/2001, Entered: None
                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Robert Fievisohn, Raponi Drywall in support of [18-1] motion for an order consolidating actions 01 cv 2601, 01 cv 2699, 01 cv 2898, cv 3121, 01 cv 3275 and 01 cv 3572 cases 01 cv 2699, 01 cv 2898, 01 cv 3121, 01 cv 3275, 01 cv 3572 and 01 cv 3694 for all purposes, [18-2] motion appointing class members Robert Fievisohn and Raponi Drywall & Plastering, Inc., to serve lead plaintiff, [18-3] motion directing that lead counsel for the class be determined by sealed bid auction . (djc) Modified on 10/25/2001 (Entered: 06/25/2001)
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/14/2001, Entered: None
                                                    CORRECTED COPY OF MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Robert Fievisohn, Raponi Drywall in support of [18-1] motion for an order consolidating actions 01 cv 2601, 01 cv 2699, 01 cv 2898, cv 3121, 01 cv 3275 and 01 cv 3572 cases 01 cv 2699, 01 cv 2898, 01 cv 3121, 01 cv 3275, 01 cv 3572 and 01 cv 3694 for all purposes, [18-2] motion appointing class members Robert Fievisohn and Raponi Drywall & Plastering, Inc., to serve lead plaintiff, [18-3] motion directing that lead counsel for the class be determined by sealed bid auction. (djc) Modified on 10/25/2001 (Entered: 06/25/2001)
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/29/2001, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION (filed on service date) of Robert Fievisohn, Raponi Drywall & Plastering, Inc; for an order consolidating actions 01 cv 2601, 01 cv 2699, 01 cv 2898, 01 cv 3121, 01 cv 3275 and 01 cv 3572 cases 01 cv 2699, 01 cv 2898, 01 cv 3121, 01 cv 3275, 01 cv 3572 and 01 cv 3694 for all purposes ; appointing class members Robert Fievisohn and Raponi Drywall & Plastering, Inc., to serve as lead plaintiff ; directing that lead counsel for the class be determined by sealed bid auction ; Return date not indicated. Attached is Affidavit in support of Gary S. Jacobson of motion. (djc) (Entered: 06/19/2001)
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/29/2001, Entered: None
                                                        DECLARATION of Thomas H. Burt, Esq. by Joseph Spinden regarding compliance with individual practice rules of Hon. Shira A. Scheindlin. (pl) Modified on 10/25/2001 (Entered: 06/05/2001)
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/29/2001, Entered: None
                                                          DECLARATION of Thomas H. Burt, Esq. by Joseph Spinden in support of Re: [14-1] motion for an order appointing The Sumner Lead Plaintiff Group to serve as Lead Plaintiff, [14-2] motion approving the Lead Plaintiff's selection of Wold, Haldenstin, Adler, Freeman & Hertz LLP and Wechsler, Harwood, Halebian & Feffer, LLP as Co-Lead Counsel, [14-3] motion to all related actions. (pl) Modified on 10/25/2001 (Entered: 06/05/2001)
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/29/2001, Entered: None
                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Joseph Spinden in support of [14-1] motion for an order appointing The Sumner Lead Plaintiff Group to serve as Lead Plaintiff, [14-2] motion approving the Lead Plaintiff's selection of Wold, Haldenstin, Adler, Freeman & Hertz LLP and Wechsler, Harwood, Halebian & Feffer, LLP as Co-Lead Counsel, [14-3] motion to consolidate all related actions . (pl) Modified on 10/24/2001 (Entered: 06/05/2001)
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/29/2001, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION (filed on service date) by Joseph Spinden for an order appointing The Sumner Lead Plaintiff Group to serve as Lead Plaintiff ; approving the Lead Plaintiff's selection of Wold, Haldenstin, Adler, Freeman & Hertz LLP and Wechsler, Harwood, Halebian & Feffer, LLP as Co-Lead Counsel ; to consolidate all related actions . Return date: not indicated (pl) (Entered: 06/05/2001)
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/29/2001, Entered: None
                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Joseph Spinden in support of [11-1] motion under Sec. 27 of the Securities Act of 1933, 15 U.S.C. Sec. 77z-1, and Sec. 21D(a)(3)(B) of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934, 15 U.S.C. Sec. 78u-4, for appointment as Lead Pltff; [11-2] motion for approval of Lead Pltff's choice of Keller Rohrback L.L.P. as Lead Counsel and Rabin & Peckel as Local Counsel for the Class. (sn) (Entered: 06/04/2001)
                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/29/2001, Entered: None
                                                                  DECLARATION of Lynn L. Sarko by Joseph Spinden in support Re: [11-1] motion under Sec. 27 of the Securities Act of 1933, 15 U.S.C. Sec. 77z-1, and Sec. 21D(a)(3)(B) of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934, 15 U.S.C. Sec. 78u-4, for appointment as Lead Pltff; [11-2] motion for approval of Lead Pltff's choice of Keller Rohrback L.L.P. as Lead Counsel and Rabin & Peckel as Local Counsel for the Class. (sn) (Entered: 06/04/2001)
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/29/2001, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE OF MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) by Joseph Spinden under Sec. 27 of the Securities Act of 1933, 15 U.S.C. Sec. 77z-1, and Sec. 21D(a)(3)(B) of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934, 15 U.S.C. Sec. 78u-4, for appointment as Lead Pltff , and for approval of Lead Pltff's choice of Keller Rohrback L.L.P. as Lead Counsel and Rabin & Peckel as Local Counsel for the Class . No return date indicated. (sn) (Entered: 06/04/2001)
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/29/2001, Entered: None
                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Alan Sher, Dane Chine, Denice Choy-Yuen, JTWROS, Raymond Rapaglia in support of [9-1] motion to consolidate cases 01 cv 2699, 01 cv 2898, 01 cv 3121, 01 cv 3275, 01 cv 3572 and 01 cv 3694, [9-2] motion approving Movants as Lead Plaintiffs, [9-3] motion approving Movants' selection of law firm of Milberg Weiss Bershad Hynes & Lerach LLP to serve as Lead Counsel. (docmt received in night dep. on 05/29/01 at 11:00 p.m.) (djc) Modified on 10/25/2001 (Entered: 05/30/2001)
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/29/2001, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION (filed on service date) of Alan Sher, Dane Chin, Denice Choy-Yuen, JTWROS, Raymond Rapaglia to consolidate cases 01 cv 2699, 01 cv 2898, 01 cv 3121, 01 cv 3275, 01 cv 3572 and 01 cv 3694 ; approving Movants as Lead Plaintiffs ; approving Movants' selection of the law firm of Milberg Weiss Bershad Hynes & Lerach LLP to serve as Lead Counsel ; Return date not indicated; (docmt received in night dep. on 05/29/01 at 10:59 p.m.) (djc) Modified on 10/25/2001 (Entered: 05/30/2001)
                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/17/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          STIPULATION and ORDER; that the Defendants' time to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint in this action is extended through and including the later of 45 days after (i) the assignment of lead plaintiffs' counsel; or (ii) the filing of an amended complaint in this action . ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ) (pl) (Entered: 05/17/2001)
                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/10/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            Notice of Case Reassignment to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. Copy of notice and judge's rules mailed to Attorney(s) of record: Christopher Lovell, Saul Roffe. (tp) (Entered: 05/11/2001)
                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/30/2001, Entered: None
                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons & Complaint as to Credit Suisse First by Janine Schampier, Legal Assistant, on 4/25/01. Answer due on 5/15/01 for Credit Suisse First. (sac) (Entered: 05/03/2001)
                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/30/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons & Complaint as to The Goldman Sachs by Patricia McGraw, Legal Assistant, on 4/25/01. Answer due on 5/15/01 for The Goldman Sachs. (sac) (Entered: 05/03/2001)
                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/30/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons & Complaint as to Merrill Lynch by James Benedict on 4/25/01. Answer due on 5/15/01 for Merrill Lynch. (sac) (Entered: 05/03/2001)
                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/10/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint as to Bancboston Robertson by Heather Lancaster, Vice President on 4/3/01. Answer due on 4/23/01 for Bancboston Robertson. (bm) (Entered: 04/11/2001)
                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/27/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                      RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by SDR Investors, LP . (bm) (Entered: 03/28/2001)
                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/27/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                        CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed. Summons issued and Notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 400932. (bm) (Entered: 03/28/2001)
                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                          This case has been viewed 186 times.

                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                          Space
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                           
                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                          Need Password Help?