Brody, et al v. Doubleclick, Inc., et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-03980
District Judge Shira A. Scheindlin, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 8, 2017 at 4:36 PM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Adele Brody, Plaintiff
No Logo Benjamin Furman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Calvin Tszeng, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Christopher Dougherty, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Dane Scott Nuanes, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
No Logo David J. Moody, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Heinz Wahl, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Jeffrey Braverman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
No Logo John Hodgson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Michael A. Benevento, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Ruth Lockard, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Sabiheh Sameyah, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Shelomoh Sameyah, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Steven J. Strandieri, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Thomas Chipain, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
v.
No Logo BT Alex. Brown, Defendant
No Logo David N. Strohm, Defendant
No Logo DB Alex. Brown, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Joel M. Mitnick +1 212 839 5300 +1 212 839 5599 jmitnick@sidley.com
No Logo Donald Peppers, Defendant
No Logo Donaldson, Lufkin & Jenrette Securities Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Doubleclick, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Friedman Kaplan Seiler & Adelman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Kevin Scott Haeberle +1 212 833 1194 +1 212 373 7994 khaeberle@fklaw.com
No Logo Dwight A. Merriman, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Edward N. Gewirtz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY LAURA M. PERRONE +1 212 949 5500 +9490 949 949 0049
The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Goldman Sachs & Co."

Represented by Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

No Logo Kevin J. O'Connor, Defendant
No Logo Kevin P. Ryan, Defendant
No Logo Mark E. Nonnelly, Defendant
No Logo Mark E. Nunnelly, Defendant
No Logo Stephen R. Collins, Defendant
No Logo W. Grant Gregory, Defendant
No Logo Ahmass Fakahany, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Ajit Balakrishnan, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Alan Nauman, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Anne Stuart, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Ariba Inc., Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Arthur Knapp, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Autoweb.com, Inc., Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Avici Systems, Inc., Consolidated Defendant
No Logo B2B Internet Holdrs, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Banc Of America Securities LLC, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Bancboston Robertson Stephens Inc., Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Bear Stearns & Co Inc, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Brian Grossi, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Bruce Davis, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Bruce Scheps, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Calico Commerce, Inc., Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Carolyn Ticknor, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Charles Hilliard, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Chase Securities Inc., Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Christos Cotsakas, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Cibc World Markets, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Corvis Corporation, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Credit Suisse First Boston Corp., Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Dain Rausher, Inc., Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Daniel H. Schulman, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo David Beirne, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo David Bohnett, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo David Chance, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo David Gathman, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo David Huber, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo David Van Wie, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Dean DeBiase, Consolidated Defendant
Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc. Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Digimarc Corporation, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo E*Offering Corp., Consolidated Defendant
No Logo E.K. Ranjit, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Edmund Fish, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Edward S. Kinsey, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Erwin Lenowitz, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Frank Bonsal, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Frank Drendel, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo G. Bradford Jones, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Geoffrey Rhoads, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo George A. Schieren, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Hambrecht & Quist, LLC, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Herbert Skeete, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo I. Robert Greene, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Internet Capital Group, Inc., Consolidated Defendant
Unknown Role, Onvia. Com. Inc.
No Logo InterTrust Technologies Corp., Consolidated Defendant
JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA, Consolidated Defendant
Officially listed as "J.P. Morgan & Co."
JPMorgan Securities, Inc. JPMorgan Securities, Inc., Consolidated Defendant
Unknown Role, CHEMICAL BANKING CORP
Unknown Role, Peloton Resources Inc
No Logo Jay Walker, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Jeffrey, Brown, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo John B. Mumford, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo JOHN PAYNE, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo John Steffens, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo John Taysom, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo John W. Lavalle, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Joseph Hardiman, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Julian Brodsky, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Keith J. Krach, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Kenneth Fox, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Larry Augustin, Consolidated Defendant
Lehman Brothers, Inc. Lehman Brothers, Inc., Consolidated Defendant
Unknown Role, Lehman Abs Corp
No Logo Lennert Leader, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Loren Smith, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Marc Ewing, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Mark Goldston, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Marvin Runyon, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Matthew Szulik, Consolidated Defendant
Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc. Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Consolidated Defendant
Unknown Role, Cumulus Media Inc.
Unknown Role, Lodgian, Inc.
Unknown Role, Mlgpe Ltd
Merrill Lynch GP Inc. Unknown Role, Merrill Lynch GP Inc.
Unknown Role, Infospace.com, Inc.
Unknown Role, New BlackRock, Inc.
Unknown Role, NATIONSBANK CORP
Bank of America, NA Unknown Role, Bank of America, NA
Unknown Role, Gabelli Utility Fund
Unknown Role, Muniholdings Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Munienhanced Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Munivest Fund II Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Clifford Chance, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY MARK HOLLAND +1 212 878 8432 +1 212 878 8375 mark.holland@cliffordchance.com
No Logo Michael Forgash, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Michael Moritz, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Milton Pappas, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Mohan Ananda, Consolidated Defendant
Morgan Stanley & Company Inc. Morgan Stanley & Company Inc., Consolidated Defendant
Officially listed as "Morgan Stanley Dean Witter & Co., Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew Brian Clubok +1 202 879 5173 +1 202 879 5200 aclubok@kirkland.com
No Logo Netzero, Inc., Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Nitin Gupta, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Paul Brauneis, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Paul Francis, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Paul Hegarty, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Peter LaBonte, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Peter Van Cuylenberg, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Philip Monego, Sr., Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Planetrx.com, Inc., Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Priceline.com Inc., Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Rajiv Warrier, Consolidated Defendant
Red Hat, Inc. Red Hat, Inc., Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Rediff.com India Ltd., Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Richard Braddock, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Richard Li, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Robert C. Kagle, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Robert E. Keith, Jr., Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Robert Young, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Robertson Stephens, Inc., Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Ronald Burr, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Salomon Smith Barney, Inc., Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Samuel Hedgepeth, III, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Scott Gould, Consolidated Defendant
Stamps.com, Inc. Stamps.com, Inc., Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Stanley E. O'Neal, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Steve Valenzuela, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Surya R. Panditi, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Thomas Bruggere, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Thomas Clancy, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Thomas Gerrity, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Thomas Murphy, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Timothy Dec, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Todd Schull, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Va Linux Systems, Inc., Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Victor Shear, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Vinod Khosla, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Walter Buckley, III, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo William Razzouk, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Anita Budich, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Anthony Voto, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Anupkumar Bhasin, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Barbara Eiseman, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo BERT ZAUDERER, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Binh O. Nguyen, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Sandy A Liebhard +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 liebhard@bernlieb.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Joseph R. Seidman +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 seidman@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Katherine B. DuBose +1 212 545 4600
No Logo Bruce J. Jiorle, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Buddy Dukeman, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Dash Limited, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Demetrios Petratos, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Deming Zhous, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Don K. Burris, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Eileen Dukeman, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Estelle L. Augustine, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Glenn Kerr, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Hans Reihl, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Joe Braswell, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Jonathan Ames, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Kenneth Shives, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Mahin S. Moshayekh, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Mark Sculnick, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Mead Ann Krim, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Mousa M. Shunnarah, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Carney Williams Bates Pulliam & Bowman, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE Randall Keith Pulliam +1 501 312 8500 +1 501 312 8505 rpulliam@carneywilliams.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cauley Geller Bowman & Coates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Steven E Cauley +1 501 312 8500 + 501 312 8505

Toggle Switch Represented by Gottlieb, Rackman & Reisman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Samuel Howard Rudman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 srudman@rgrdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew L. Barroway +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 abarroway@sbtklaw.com

Represented by Milberg LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Seeger Weiss LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY David R. Buchanan +1 212 584 0700 +1 212 584 0799 DBuchanan@SeegerWeiss.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen A. Weiss +1 212 584 0700 +1 212 584 0799 sweiss@seegerweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson & Wright

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY STUART LANE BERMAN +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 sberman@ktmc.com
No Logo Philip Warner, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Rachel Schwartz, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Radiant Advisers, LLC, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Sandy A Liebhard +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 liebhard@bernlieb.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Joseph R. Seidman +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 seidman@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Katherine B. DuBose +1 212 545 4600
No Logo Raymond Lance Huffman, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Raymond Litwin, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo RICHARD L. ANDERSON, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Robert Grovich, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Roderick Lau, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Susan Katz, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Val Kay, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Carney Williams Bates Pulliam & Bowman, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE Randall Keith Pulliam +1 501 312 8500 +1 501 312 8505 rpulliam@carneywilliams.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cauley Geller Bowman & Coates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Steven E Cauley +1 501 312 8500 + 501 312 8505

Toggle Switch Represented by Gottlieb, Rackman & Reisman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Samuel Howard Rudman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 srudman@rgrdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew L. Barroway +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 abarroway@sbtklaw.com

Represented by Milberg LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Seeger Weiss LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY David R. Buchanan +1 212 584 0700 +1 212 584 0799 DBuchanan@SeegerWeiss.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen A. Weiss +1 212 584 0700 +1 212 584 0799 sweiss@seegerweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson & Wright

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY STUART LANE BERMAN +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 sberman@ktmc.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 77
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (32) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 32 Filed: 12/1/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT settling ation. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 11/24/09) (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Right to Appeal)(dt) (Entered: 12/03/2009)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
    NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AND SIMULTANEOUS APPEARANCE OF SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, ORDER; that the law firm of Morrison & Foerster LLP, counsel for DoubleClick, Inc. hereby withdraws as counsel of record, Friedman Kaplan Seiler & Adelman LLP hereby enters its notice of appearance as Attorney, Kevin Scott Haeberle for Doubleclick, Inc. added. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 5/15/08) (sac) (Entered: 05/16/2008)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/13/2003, Entered: None
      ANSWER to Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Salomon Smith Barney Inc.. Related document: 22 Amended Complaint, filed by Heinz Wahl, Jeffrey Braverman, Christopher Dougherty, Shelomoh Sameyah, Sabiheh Sameyah, Dane Scott Nuanes, Michael A. Benevento, Benjamin Furman, John Hodgson, Ruth Lockard, David J. Moody, Steven J. Strandieri, Calvin Tszeng, Thomas Chipain.(sac, ) (Entered: 03/26/2004)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/13/2003, Entered: None
        ANSWER to Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Credit Suisse First Boston Corp.. Related document: 22 Amended Complaint, filed by Heinz Wahl, Jeffrey Braverman, Christopher Dougherty, Shelomoh Sameyah, Sabiheh Sameyah, Dane Scott Nuanes, Michael A. Benevento, Benjamin Furman, John Hodgson, Ruth Lockard, David J. Moody, Steven J. Strandieri, Calvin Tszeng, Thomas Chipain.(sac, ) (Entered: 03/26/2004)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/29/2003, Entered: None
          ANSWER by Morgan Stanley Dean to [22-1] amended complaint . (Attorney Andrew B. Clubok from the Firm: Kirkland and Ellis, LLP). (sac) (Entered: 11/10/2003)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: None
            ANSWER by Goldman Sachs & Co. to [22-1] amended complaint . (Attorney Penny Shane from the Firm: Sullivan & Cromwell, LLP). (sac) (Entered: 09/19/2003)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: None
              ANSWER by DB Alex. Brown to [22-1] amended complaint . (Attorney Joel M. Mitnick from the Sidley, Austin, Brown & Wood, LLP). (sac) (Entered: 09/16/2003)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: None
                ANSWER by Merrill Lynch, Pierc to [22-1] amended complaint (Attorney Mark Holland from the Firm: Clifford Chance US, LLP). (sac) (Entered: 09/16/2003)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/27/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                  CONSENT ORDER, substituting Laura M. Perrone, PLLC in place of Harvey Greenfield as counsel for pltff Jerry Krim. ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); (sac) (Entered: 03/17/2003)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/15/2003, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of REGISTRATION AND FIRM NAME CHANGE by Goldman Sachs & Co. Re: Sullivan & Cromwell LLP. (jw) (Entered: 03/06/2003)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None
                      AMENDED COMPLAINT by Dane Scott Nuanes, Michael A. Benevento, Jeffrey Braverman, Christopher Dougherty, Benjamin Furman, John Hodgson, Ruth Lockard, David J. Moody, Shelomoh Sameyah, Sabiheh Sameyah, Steven J. Strandieri, Calvin Tszeng, Heinz Wahl, Thomas Chipain amending [1-1] complaint ; Summons issued. (ac) Modified on 06/17/2002 (Entered: 06/12/2002)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/25/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                        STIPULATION and ORDER, pltffs agree to and here dismiss without prejudice all claims against: DoubleClick, Inc., Kevin J. O'Connor, Kevin P. Ryan, Dwight A. Merriman, Stephen R. Collins, Mark E. Nunnelly, W. Grant Gregory, Donald Peppers, David N. Strohm, Scott Gould to the extent the are named in any of the following actions listed herein. DoubleClick, Inc., Kevin J. O'Connor, Stephen R. Collins, David N. Strohm, Mark E. Nunnelly, W Grant Gregory, Donald Peppers and Thomas S. Murphy shall remain named as consolidated defts in the consolidated lead case 01 Civ. 3980, only in connection with the claims asserted against them in 01 Civ. 10211, which is to be consolidated with the lead case 01 Civ. 3980 purs. to the Court's order of consolidation entered in such lead case and dated 9/5/01. Pltffs agree to and here dismiss without prejudice all claims against: Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., Seth D. Neiman, Gregory L. Reyes, Michael J. Byrd to the extent they are named in any of the following actions: 01 Civ. 6613 01 Civ. 8663; 01 Civ. 8673. Pltffs agree to and hereby dismiss without prejudice all claims against: Extreme Networks, Inc., Gordon Stitt, Vito Palermo, Stephen Haddock, Herb Schneider, William Kelly, George Prodan, Paul Romeo, Harry Silverglide, Charles Carinalli, Promod Haque, Lawrence K. Orr, Peter Wolken to the extent they are named in any of the following actions: 01 Civ. 6700; 01 Civ. 6739. Extreme Networks, Inc., Gordon Stitt, Vito Palermo, Stephen Haddock, Herb Schneider, William Kelly, George Prodan, Paul Romeo, Harry Silverglide, Charles Carinalli, Promod Haque, Lawrence K. Orr, Peter Wolken shall remain named as consolidated defts in the consolidated lead case 01 Civ. 6143 only in connection with the claims asserted agains them in the amended complaint filed 12/6/01 in 01 Civ. 6368, which case is to be closed and consolidated with new lead case 01 Civ. 6143 purs. to Court's order of consolidation dated 1/15/02. Pltffs agree to and hereby dismiss without prejudice all claims against: Tibco Software Inc., Vivek Y. Ranadive, Paul G. Hansen, Douglas M. Atkin, Yogen K. Dalal, Edward R. Kozel, Donald J. Listwin, Larry W. Sonsini, John G. Gaysom, Philip Wood, Robert Stefanski to the extent they are named in any of the following actions: 01 Civ. 6110; 01 Civ. 6778; 01 Civ. 6774; 01 Civ. 6877; 01 Civ. 7840; 01 Civ. 8786. Tibco Software Inc., Vivek Y. Ranadive, Paul G. Hansen, Douglas M. Atkin, Yogen K. Dalal, Edward R. Kozel, Donald J. Listwin, Larry W. Sonsini, John G. Gaysom, Philip Wood, Robert Stefanski shall remain named as consolidated defts in the consolidated lead case 01 Civ. 6110 only in connection with the claims asserted against them in the amended complaint filed 12/6/01 in 01 Civ. 6440, which case was closed and consolidated with the lead case 01 Civ. 6110 purs. to the Court's order of consolidated entered in such lead case and dated 9/10/01. Pltffs agree to and hereby dismiss without prejudice all claims against: Redback Networks, Inc., Dennis L. Barsema, Geoffrey C. Darby to the extent they are named in any of the following actions: 01 Civ. 6090; 01 Civ. 6135; 01 Civ. 6401; 01 Civ. 6436; 01 Civ. 6443; 01 Civ. 6615; 01 Civ. 6740; 01 Civ. 7429; 01 Civ. 7658 01 Civ. 7772; 01 Civ. 8352. Pltffs agree to and hereby dismiss without prejudice all claims against: Retek, Inc., John Buchanan, Gregory A. Effertz, Gordon Masson to the extent they are named in any of the following actions: 01 Civ. 5225 and cases consolidated thereunder. Pltffs agree to and hereby dismiss without prejudice all claims against: Ariba, Inc., Keith J. Krach, Edward P. Kinsey, Robert C. Kagle, John B. Mumford, Paul Hegarty, Hatim A. Tyabji to the extent they are named in any of the following actions: 01 Civ. 2359, and cases consolidated thereunder; 01 Civ. 4956. Pltffs agree to and hereby dismiss without prejudice all claims against: Lionbridge Tech., Inc., Rory J. Cowan, Stephen J. Lifshatz, Guy L. de Chazal, Marcia J. Hooper, Stephen M. Jenks, Paul Kavanagh, Claude P. Sheer in 01 Civ. 6770, subject to the execution by the Issuer Deft and Individual Defts named therein of a totalling agreement substantially in the form attached hereto as Exhibit A. Each deft dismissed from the IPO Actions purs. to this Stip. and Order hereby agrees that he or she or it will not seek to recover from Pltffs those costs incurred up to the date of entry of the dismissal of such deft, provided, however, that such deft is not later reinstated as a deft in an IPO Action by Pltffs or their respective counsel in connection with the same or substantially the same claims arising from the same public offering identified in those complaints from which such defts were dismissed purs. to this stip. and order. ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin )... Duplicate copies of Stip. and Order filed in 01 Civ. 3980; 01 Civ. 4034; 01 Civ. 4099; 01 Civ. 4263; 01 Civ. 4515; 01 Civ. 4782; 01 Civ. 5667 01 Civ. 7635; 01 Civ. 10211; 01 Civ. 6613; 01 Civ. 8663; 01 Civ. 8673; 01 Civ. 6700; 01 Civ. 6739; 01 Civ. 6143 01 Civ. 6368; 01 Civ. 6110; 01 Civ. 6778; 01 Civ. 6774; 01 Civ. 6877 01 Civ. 7840; 01 Civ. 8786; 01 Civ. 6440; 01 Civ. 6090; 01 Civ. 6135; 01 Civ. 6401; 01 Civ. 6436; 01 Civ. 6443 01 Civ. 6615; 01 Civ. 6740; 01 Civ. 7429; 01 Civ. 7658; 01 Civ. 7772 01 Civ. 8352; 01 Civ. 5225; 01 Civ. 2359; 01 Civ. 6770; 01 Civ. 4956. (tr) Modified on 06/17/2002 (Entered: 03/11/2002)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER, Shives, et al., v. Banc of America Securities, et al., (01 Civ. 4956) was improperly consolidated into the... lead case... that the following individuals and entities are accordingly to be removed from the DoubleClick consolidated docket (01 Civ. 3980): Consolidated Defendants to be removed: Banc of America Securities LLC, Bancboston Robertson Stephens, Inc., Bear Stearns & Co., Inc., BT Alex Brown, Inc., Chase Securities, Inc., CIBC World Markets, Credit Suisse First Boston Corp., Dain Rausher, Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., E Offering Corp., Fleetboston Robertson Stephens, Inc., Hambrecht & Quist, LLC, JP Morgan & Co., JP Morgan Securities, Lehman Brothers, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Morgan Stanley Dean Witter & Co., Inc., Salomon Smith Barney Inc., Ariba, Inc., Robert C. Kagle, John B. Mumford, Keith J. Krach, Paul Hegarty, Edward S. Kinsey, Auotweb.com, Inc., Dean Debiase, Samuel Hedgepeth, III, Avici Systems, Inc., Surya Panditi, Paul Brauneis, B2B Internet Holdrs, Ahmass Fakahany, John Steffens, Stanley E. O'Neal, George A. Schieren, Calico Commerce, Inc., Alan Nauman, Arthur Knapp, Corvis Corporation, David Huber, Anne Stuart, Timothy Dec, Frank Bonsal, Vinod Khosla, Frank Drendel, Joseph Hardiman, Digimarc Corporation, Bruce Davis, Geoffrey Rhoads, E.K. Ranjit, Philip Monego, Sr., Brian Grossi, John Taysom, Internet Capital Group, Inc., Walter Buckley, III, Robert E. Keith, Jr., Kenneth Fox, David Gathman, Julian Brodsky, Michael Forgash, Thomas Gerrity, Intertrust Technologies Corp., Victor Shear, David Chance, Peter Van Cuylenberg, Edmund Fish, Erwin Lenowitz, David Van Wie, Bruce Scheps, I. Robert Greene, Peter Labonte, Lennert Leader, Milton Pappas, Herbert Skeete, Netzero, Inc., Mark Goldston, Charles Hilliard, Ronald Burr, Planetrx.com, Inc., William Razzouk, Steve Valenzuela, David Beirne, Michael Moritz, Christos Cotsakas, Priceline.com, Inc., Richard Braddock, Jay Walker, Paul Francis, Daniel H. Schulman, Rediff.com India, Ltd., Ajit Balakrishnan, Richard Li, Nitin Gupta, Rajiv Warrier, Red Hat, Inc., Robert Young, Matthew Szulik, Marc Ewing Statmps.com, Inc., John Payne, John W. Lavalle, Thomas Bruggere, Mohan Ananda, David Bohnertt, Jeffrey Brown, Thomas Clancy, G. Bradford Jones, Marvin Runyon, Loren Smith, Carolyn Ticknor, VA Linux Systems, Inc., Larry Augustin and Todd Schull. Consolidated Plaintiffs to be removed: Demetrios Petratos, Kenneth Shives, Deming Zhous, Bert Zauderef, Glenn Kerr, Robert Grovich, Hans Reihl, Heinz Wahl., Bruce J. Jiorle, Mark Sculnick, Susan Katz, Anthony Voto, Estelle L. Augustine, Don K. Burris, Rachel Schwartz, Roderick Lau, Raymond Litwin, Joe Braswell, Buddy Dukeman, Eileen Dukeman, Anupkumar Bhasin, Richard L. Anderson, Raymond Lance Huffman and Anita Budich... ( Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. (dcap) (Entered: 06/17/2002)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/9/2002, Entered: None
                            AMENDED RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Goldman Sachs & Co. (sac) (Entered: 02/12/2002)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/26/2001, Entered: None
                              RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Goldman Sachs & Co. (sac) (Entered: 10/03/2001)
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/7/2001, Entered: None
                                RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by The Pltffs on whose behalf Kirby, McInerney & Squire, LLP. (sac) (Entered: 10/03/2001)
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/7/2001, Entered: None
                                  RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by The Pltffs on whose behalf Brodsky & Smith, LLC. (sac) (Entered: 10/03/2001)
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/7/2001, Entered: None
                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Erma Prentice of Cases; Motions; Rule 1/9; Contract and Non-IPO by fax as to counsel on 9/7/01. (sac) (Entered: 10/03/2001)
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/5/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER, that all cases against Doubleclick, Inc. in this IPO Securities Litigation, as set forth in the attached Rider (1:01-cv-4034, 1:01-cv-4099, 1:01-cv-4263, 1:01-cv-4515, 1:01-cv-4782, 1:01-cv-5667, 1:01-cv-7635, 1:01-cv-10211) shall be consolidated into case number 01 Civ. 3980. The Clerk of the Court is ordered to consolidate any future cases filed against Doubleclick, Inc. subsequent to the date of this Order into lead case number 01 Civ. 3980. The Clerk of the Court is further ordered to close all cases that have been consolidated, subject to re-opening at a later date on proper application by a party. ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. (sac) Modified on 03/12/2002 (Entered: 09/25/2001)
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/27/2001, Entered: None
                                        RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Doubleclick, Inc. (rec'd in the night deposit box on 8/27/01 at 5:00 p.m.) (sac) (Entered: 08/29/2001)
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          Notice of Case Reassignment to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. Copy of notice mailed to Attorney(s) of record. Pursuant to the Order of Chief Judge Mukasey dated August 8, 2001, the above entitled action is reassigned to the calendar of Judge Shira A. Scheindlin for inclusion in the coordinated pretrial proceedings being conducted by that judge. Two originals of all future documents submitted in this action are to be presented in the Clerk's Office for filing. One original is to be filed in this docket number and one original is to be filed in the miscellaneous case number 21mc92 (SAS). Each shall bear the original assigned judge's ( ) initials after the original docket number. Attached is a copy of Judge Mukasey's ORDER re: coordinating the proceedings before Judge Scheindlin. Also attached is a copy of Judge Scheindlin's ORDER re: set initial PTC 09/07/01 and directing all counsel to comply with judge Scheindlin's requirements. [Original Orders docketed in 21mc92 (SAS) as documents numbers 1 and 2] (dcap) Modified on 02/26/2002 (Entered: 08/10/2001)
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/25/2001, Entered: None
                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Dane Scott Nuanes in opposition to [8-1] motion to consolidate cases 1:01-cv-03980, 1:01-cv-04034, 1:01-cv-04099, 1:01-cv-04263, 1:01-cv-04515, 1:01-cv-04782, 1:01-cv-05567, [8-2] motion appointing Class Members Val Kay and Mousa M. Shunnarah as Lead Plaintiffs, and [8-3] motion approving Class Members Val Kay and Mousa M. Shunnarah's selection of the law firms of Milberg Weiss Bershad Hynes & Lerach LLP to serve as Lead Counsel. (kw) (Entered: 07/26/2001)
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/9/2001, Entered: None
                                              DECLARATION of Samuel H. Rudman by Val Kay, Mousa M. Shunnarah in support Re: [8-1] motion to consolidate cases 1:01-cv-03980, 1:01-cv-04034, 1:01-cv-04099, 1:01-cv-04263, 1:01-cv-04515, 1:01-cv-04782, 1:01-cv-05567, [8-2] motion appointing Class Members Val Kay and Mousa M. Shunnarah as Lead Plaintiffs, [8-3] motion approving Class Members Val Kay and Mousa M. Shunnarah's selection of the law firms of Milberg Weiss Bershad Hynes & Lerach LLP to serve as Lead Counsel. [Received in the Night Deposit Box on07-09-01 at 11:31 PM] [Original filed in 1:01-cv-03980 Document No. 10. Docketed in 1:01-cv-04034, 1:01-cv-04099, 1:01-cv-04263, 1:01-cv-04515, 1:01-cv-04782, 1:01-cv-05567] (dcap) (Entered: 07/26/2001)
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/9/2001, Entered: None
                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Val Kay, Mousa M. Shunnarah in support of [8-1] motion to consolidate cases 1:01-cv-03980, 1:01-cv-04034, 1:01-cv-04099, 1:01-cv-04263, 1:01-cv-04515, 1:01-cv-04782, 1:01-cv-05567, [8-2] motion appointing Class Members Val Kay and Mousa M. Shunnarah as Lead Plaintiffs, [8-3] motion approving Class Members Val Kay and Mousa M. Shunnarah's selection of the law firms of Milberg Weiss Bershad Hynes & Lerach LLP to serve as Lead Counsel. [Received in the Night Deposit Box on 07-09-01 at 11:31 PM] [Original filed in 1:01-cv-03980 Document No. 9. Docketed in 1:01-cv-04034, 1:01-cv-04099, 1:01-cv-04263, 1:01-cv-04515, 1:01-cv-04782, 1:01-cv-05567] (dcap) (Entered: 07/26/2001)
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/9/2001, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION by Val Kay, Mousa M. Shunnarah to consolidate cases 1:01-cv-03980, 1:01-cv-04034, 1:01-cv-04099, 1:01-cv-04263, 1:01-cv-04515, 1:01-cv-04782, 1:01-cv-05567 , and appointing Class Members Val Kay and Mousa M. Shunnarah as Lead Plaintiffs , and approving Class Members Val Kay and Mousa M. Shunnarah's selection of the law firms of Milberg Weiss Bershad Hynes & Lerach LLP to serve as Lead Counsel . No Return Date. [Received in the Night Deposit Box on 07-09-01 at 11:31 PM] [Original filed in 1:01-cv-03980 Document No. 8. Docketed in 1:01-cv-04034; 1:01-cv-04099; 1:01-cv-04263; 1:01-cv-04515; 1:01-cv-04782; 1:01-cv-05667] (dcap) (Entered: 07/26/2001)
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/9/2001, Entered: None
                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Joseph R. Seidman, Jr. by Radiant Advisers, Binh O. Nguyen in support of [5-1] motion to consolidate cases 1:01-cv-03980, 1:01-cv-04034, 1:01-cv-04099, 1:01-cv-04263, 1:01-cv-04515, 1:01-cv-04782, 1:01-cv-05567, [5-2] motion appointing Class Members Radiant Advisers, LLC and Binh O. Nguyen to serve as Lead Plaintiffs, [5-3] motion approving Class Members Radiant Advisers, LLC and Binh O. Nguyen's selection of counsel for the Class. [Received in the Night Deposit Box on 07-09-01 at 6:15 PM] [Original filed in 1:01-cv-03980 Document No. 7. Docketed in 1:01-cv-04034, 1:01-cv-04099, 1:01-cv-04263, 1:01-cv-04515, 1:01-cv-04782, 1:01-cv-05567] (dcap) (Entered: 07/26/2001)
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/9/2001, Entered: None
                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Radiant Advisers, Binh O. Nguyen in support of [5-1] motion to consolidate cases 1:01-cv-03980, 1:01-cv-04034, 1:01-cv-04099, 1:01-cv-04263, 1:01-cv-04515, 1:01-cv-04782, 1:01-cv-05567, [5-2] motion appointing Class Members Radiant Advisers, LLC and Binh O. Nguyen to serve as Lead Plaintiffs, [5-3] motion approving Class Members Radiant Advisers, LLC and Binh O. Nguyen's selection of counsel for the Class. [Received in the Night Deposit Box on 07-09-01 at 6:15 PM] [Original filed in 1:01-cv-03980 Document No. 6. Docketed in 1:01-cv-04034; 1:01-cv-04099, 1:01-cv-04263, 1:01-cv-04515, 1:01-cv-04782, 1:01-cv-05567] (dcap) (Entered: 07/26/2001)
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/9/2001, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION by Radiant Advisers, Binh O. Nguyen to consolidate cases 1:01-cv-03980, 1:01-cv-04034, 1:01-cv-04099, 1:01-cv-04263, 1:01-cv-04515, 1:01-cv-04782, 1:01-cv-05567 , and appointing Class Members Radiant Advisers, LLC and Binh O. Nguyen to serve as Lead Plaintiffs , and approving Class Members Radiant Advisers, LLC and Binh O. Nguyen's selection of counsel for the Class . No Return Date. Proposed Order attached. [Received in the Night Deposit Box on 07-09-01 at 6:14 PM] [Original filed in 1:01-cv-03980 Document No. 5. Docketed in 1:01-cv-04034; 1:01-cv-04099; 1:01-cv-04263; 1:01-cv-04515; 1:01-cv-04782; 1:01-cv-05667] (dcap) (Entered: 07/26/2001)
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/8/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          STIPULATION and ORDER; that the defendants' time to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint in this action is extended through and including the later of 60 days after (i) the assignment of lead plaintiffs' counsel; or (ii) the filing of an amended complaint in this action . ( signed by Judge Denny Chin ) (kkc) (Entered: 06/08/2001)
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/21/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Denny Chin. Copy of notice and judge's rules mailed to Attorney(s) of record: Joseph H. Weiss. (tp) (Entered: 05/21/2001)
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/10/2001, Entered: None
                                                              AFFIRMATION of Joseph H. Weiss by Adele Brody Re: [1-1] complaint requesting that this action be filed as related to case 01cv3899 (MGC). (jco) (Entered: 05/11/2001)
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/10/2001, Entered: None
                                                                CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed. Summons issued and Notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 405446. (jco) (Entered: 05/11/2001)
                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                  Statistics

                                                                  This case has been viewed 347 times.

                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                  Space
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                   
                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                  Need Password Help?